De Cristo Cano et al v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: Corazon De Cristo Cano, Terry Hardin, Crystal Irvin, Angelina Pinahardin, Jeannette Sale, Jeff Ahlers, Tanya Allemang, Mohamad Bachrouche, Logan Barnes, Jeff Bohi, James Booth, Susan Bruyere, John Caligiuri, Stephanie Caligiuri, Ricardo Chavez, Naomi Chiba, Josef Christ, Nicholas Christiansen, Margaret Clark, Ann Colt, David Courret-Knight, Neil Custer, Shawn Danneker, Shad Davis, Scott Dawson, Darryn Deline, Gregg Dillingham, Jared Dominick, Teresa Dominick, Kathyrn Draper, Anthony Dray, Marie Dreyer, Michelle Duncan, David Edewaard, Mary Ruth Edwards, Heidi Fernandez, Jennifer Fish, Dorothy Frenzel, Sharon Freeland, Robert Frey, Janet Friesz, Lisa Frost, John Grant, Roger Graves, Matthew Gray, Jerry Gridley, Joe Hanna, Douglas Hart, Marguerite Hart, Chamise Hartman, Pamela Hartsock, Jamie Heijamns, Larry Herbert, James Horton, Dawnette Hunter, Ron Irvin, Samantha Keegan, John Keisling, Jeff Jensen, Dwight King, Erika Jordan, Jason Kofoed, Lindsay Liberto, Sam Lopez, Gale Lyon, Morgan Magill, Lisa McClain, Jeffrey McCoy, Lance McDonald, Trent Mooney, Tim Moroney, Joelle Moss, Julia Myers, Jeff Neilson, Keith Newberry, Yana Noyola, Patrick Paeschke, Randall Perkes, Douglas Perkins, Bryan Raeder, John Randall, Kevin Reberger, Carol Reid, Ramon Riojas, Matthew Reed, Tracey Rittenbach, Jennifer Roames, Susan Rogers, Mischelle Russell, Tony Savino, Nancy Scala, Karen Shultz, Brittany Skaar, Mark Smith, James Snyder, Tim Solberg, Matt Sterba, Keira Taylor, Roger Szelmeczka, Douglas Teachout, Jarrid Thomson, Victor Thorne, Victor Tverdokhleb, Eva Upchurch, Rachel Waldron, Mark Watson, Scott Weidle, Anthony Wilson, Paul Winger, Robert Wood, Myra Wynn and Tiffany Zerangue
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Office of Personnel Management, Kiran Ahuja, General Services Administration, Robin Carnahan, Jeffrey Zients, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Rochelle P. Walensky, Department of Veterans Affairs, Denis McDonough, Deanne Criswell, Eric L. Patterson, Office of Management and Budget, Shalanda Young, James M. Murray and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00193
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 bb Religious Freedom Restoration Act of 1993
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Dismissing Complaint (Doc. No. #3 ). Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/4/2022. (axc)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Jeff Ahlers, Tanya Allemang, Mohamad Bachrouche, Logan Barnes, Jeff Bohi, James Booth, Susan Bruyere, John Caligiuri, Stephanie Caligiuri, Ricardo Chavez, Naomi Chiba, Josef Christ, Nicholas Christiansen, Margaret Clark, Ann Colt, David Courret-Knight, Neil Custer, Shawn Danneker, Shad Davis, Scott Dawson, Corazon De Cristo Cano, Darryn Deline, Gregg Dillingham, Jared Dominick, Teresa Dominick, Kathyrn Draper, Anthony Dray, Marie Dreyer, Michelle Duncan, David Edewaard, Mary Ruth Edwards, Heidi Fernandez, Jennifer Fish, Sharon Freeland, Dorothy Frenzel, Robert Frey, Janet Friesz, Lisa Frost, John Grant, Roger Graves, Matthew Gray, Jerry Gridley, Joe Hanna, Terry Hardin, Douglas Hart, Marguerite Hart, Chamise Hartman, Pamela Hartsock, Jamie Heijamns, Larry Herbert, James Horton, Dawnette Hunter, Crystal Irvin, Ron Irvin, Jeff Jensen, Erika Jordan, Samantha Keegan, John Keisling, Dwight King, Jason Kofoed, Lindsay Liberto, Sam Lopez, Gale Lyon, Morgan Magill, Lisa McClain, Jeffrey McCoy, Lance McDonald, Trent Mooney, Tim Moroney, Joelle Moss, Julia Myers, Jeff Neilson, Keith Newberry, Yana Noyola, Patrick Paeschke, Randall Perkes, Douglas Perkins, Angelina Pinahardin, Bryan Raeder, John Randall, Kevin Reberger, Matthew Reed, Carol Reid, Ramon Riojas, Tracey Rittenbach, Jennifer Roames, Susan Rogers, Mischelle Russell, Jeannette Sale, Tony Savino, Nancy Scala, Karen Shultz, Brittany Skaar, Mark Smith, James Snyder, Tim Solberg, Matt Sterba, Roger Szelmeczka, Keira Taylor, Douglas Teachout, Jarrid Thomson, Victor Thorne, Victor Tverdokhleb, Eva Upchurch, Rachel Waldron, Mark Watson, Scott Weidle, Anthony Wilson, Paul Winger, Robert Wood, Myra Wynn, Tiffany Zerangue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Declaration Declaration of Jeff Bohi, #5 Declaration Declaration of Dorothy Frenzel, #6 Declaration Declaration of Nicholas Christiansen, #7 Declaration Declaration of Jarrid Thomson, #8 Declaration Declaration of Paul Winger, #9 Declaration Declaration of Susan Bruyere, #10 Declaration Declaration of Janet Friesz, #11 Declaration Declaration of Roger Graves, #12 Declaration Declaration of Karen Schultz, #13 Declaration Declaration of Matt Sterba)(Kreep, Gary) (anh).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff's Reply [Doc. No. #9 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/14/2022. (axc)
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte TRO by Jeff Ahlers, Tanya Allemang, Mohamad Bachrouche, Logan Barnes, Jeff Bohi, James Booth, Susan Bruyere, John Caligiuri, Stephanie Caligiuri, Ricardo Chavez, Naomi Chiba, Josef Christ, Nicholas Christiansen, Margaret Clark, Ann Colt, David Courret-Knight, Neil Custer, Shawn Danneker, Shad Davis, Scott Dawson, Corazon De Cristo Cano, Darryn Deline, Gregg Dillingham, Jared Dominick, Teresa Dominick, Kathyrn Draper, Anthony Dray, Marie Dreyer, Michelle Duncan, David Edewaard, Mary Ruth Edwards, Heidi Fernandez, Jennifer Fish, Sharon Freeland, Dorothy Frenzel, Robert Frey, Janet Friesz, Lisa Frost, John Grant, Roger Graves, Matthew Gray, Jerry Gridley, Joe Hanna, Terry Hardin, Douglas Hart, Marguerite Hart, Chamise Hartman, Pamela Hartsock, Jamie Heijamns, Larry Herbert, James Horton, Dawnette Hunter, Crystal Irvin, Ron Irvin, Jeff Jensen, Erika Jordan, Samantha Keegan, John Keisling, Dwight King, Jason Kofoed, Lindsay Liberto, Sam Lopez, Gale Lyon, Morgan Magill, Lisa McClain, Jeffrey McCoy, Lance McDonald, Trent Mooney, Tim Moroney, Joelle Moss, Julia Myers, Jeff Neilson, Keith Newberry, Yana Noyola, Patrick Paeschke, Randall Perkes, Douglas Perkins, Angelina Pinahardin, Bryan Raeder, John Randall, Kevin Reberger, Matthew Reed, Carol Reid, Ramon Riojas, Tracey Rittenbach, Jennifer Roames, Susan Rogers, Mischelle Russell, Jeannette Sale, Tony Savino, Nancy Scala, Karen Shultz, Brittany Skaar, Mark Smith, James Snyder, Tim Solberg, Matt Sterba, Roger Szelmeczka, Keira Taylor, Douglas Teachout, Jarrid Thomson, Victor Thorne, Victor Tverdokhleb, Eva Upchurch, Rachel Waldron, Mark Watson, Scott Weidle, Anthony Wilson, Paul Winger, Robert Wood, Myra Wynn, Tiffany Zerangue. (Kreep, Gary) (axc).
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Deanne Criswell, Department of Veterans Affairs, General Services Administration, Denis McDonough, James M. Murray, Office of Management and Budget, Eric L. Patterson, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Rochelle P. Walensky, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Torres, Valerie) (anh).
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of time for Defendants to Respond to Ex Parte Application [Doc. No. #6 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/23/2022. (anh)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application by Joseph R. Biden. (Torres, Valerie)Attorney Valerie Torres added to party Joseph R. Biden(pty:dft) (anh).
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam Lopez, Heidi Fernandez, Lindsay Liberto, Jared Dominick, Stephanie Caligiuri, John Randall, Douglas Hart, Teresa Dominick, Kevin Reberger, Dawnette Hunter, Yana Noyola, Matthew Gray, Susan Rogers, Naomi Chiba, Nicholas Christiansen, Jeff Ahlers, Joe Hanna, Douglas Perkins, Ricardo Chavez, Michelle Duncan, Roger Szelmeczka, Victor Thorne, Douglas Teachout, Mark Watson, Patrick Paeschke, Mohamad Bachrouche, Lance McDonald, Janet Friesz, Pamela Hartsock, Jennifer Fish, David Edewaard, Carol Reid, Trent Mooney, Gale Lyon, Logan Barnes, Jeff Neilson, Jeffrey McCoy, Mary Ruth Edwards, Tim Solberg, Julia Myers, Scott Dawson, Mark Smith, Tiffany Zerangue, Morgan Magill, Nancy Scala, Robert Frey, Erika Jordan, Susan Bruyere, Bryan Raeder, Shad Davis, Rachel Waldron, Margaret Clark, Neil Custer, Jeff Jensen, Keira Taylor, Crystal Irvin, Josef Christ, James Booth, Marie Dreyer, Angelina Pinahardin, Matt Sterba, Dwight King, Chamise Hartman, Tony Savino, Anthony Dray, John Keisling, Jamie Heijamns, Jarrid Thomson, Samantha Keegan, James Snyder, Eva Upchurch, Jerry Gridley, Ramon Riojas, James Horton, Roger Graves, Sharon Freeland, Lisa McClain, Jason Kofoed, Keith Newberry, Myra Wynn, Ann Colt, Marguerite Hart, David Courret-Knight, Jennifer Roames, Shawn Danneker, Jeff Bohi, Corazon De Cristo Cano, Tim Moroney, John Caligiuri, Lisa Frost, Dorothy Frenzel, Kathyrn Draper, Anthony Wilson, Mischelle Russell, Randall Perkes, Gregg Dillingham, Paul Winger, Joelle Moss, Victor Tverdokhleb, Robert Wood, Tanya Allemang, Larry Herbert, John Grant, Terry Hardin, Brittany Skaar, Karen Shultz, Scott Weidle, Ron Irvin, Darryn Deline, Jeannette Sale, Matthew Reed, Tracey Rittenbach. All Defendants served. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Proof of Service, #6 Proof of Service, #7 Proof of Service, #8 Proof of Service, #9 Proof of Service, #10 Proof of Service, #11 Proof of Service, #12 Proof of Service)(Kreep, Gary) (anh).
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order [Doc. No. #3 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/15/2022.(anh)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue by Jeff Ahlers, Tanya Allemang, Mohamad Bachrouche, Logan Barnes, Jeff Bohi, James Booth, Susan Bruyere, John Caligiuri, Stephanie Caligiuri, Ricardo Chavez, Naomi Chiba, Josef Christ, Nicholas Christiansen, Margaret Clark, Ann Colt, David Courret-Knight, Neil Custer, Shawn Danneker, Shad Davis, Scott Dawson, Corazon De Cristo Cano, Darryn Deline, Gregg Dillingham, Jared Dominick, Teresa Dominick, Kathyrn Draper, Anthony Dray, Marie Dreyer, Michelle Duncan, David Edewaard, Mary Ruth Edwards, Heidi Fernandez, Jennifer Fish, Sharon Freeland, Dorothy Frenzel, Robert Frey, Janet Friesz, Lisa Frost, John Grant, Roger Graves, Matthew Gray, Jerry Gridley, Joe Hanna, Terry Hardin, Douglas Hart, Marguerite Hart, Chamise Hartman, Pamela Hartsock, Jamie Heijamns, Larry Herbert, James Horton, Dawnette Hunter, Crystal Irvin, Ron Irvin, Jeff Jensen, Erika Jordan, Samantha Keegan, John Keisling, Dwight King, Jason Kofoed, Lindsay Liberto, Sam Lopez, Gale Lyon, Morgan Magill, Lisa McClain, Jeffrey McCoy, Lance McDonald, Trent Mooney, Tim Moroney, Joelle Moss, Julia Myers, Jeff Neilson, Keith Newberry, Yana Noyola, Patrick Paeschke, Randall Perkes, Douglas Perkins, Angelina Pinahardin, Bryan Raeder, John Randall, Kevin Reberger, Matthew Reed, Carol Reid, Ramon Riojas, Tracey Rittenbach, Jennifer Roames, Susan Rogers, Mischelle Russell, Jeannette Sale, Tony Savino, Nancy Scala, Karen Shultz, Brittany Skaar, Mark Smith, James Snyder, Tim Solberg, Matt Sterba, Roger Szelmeczka, Keira Taylor, Douglas Teachout, Jarrid Thomson, Victor Thorne, Victor Tverdokhleb, Eva Upchurch, Rachel Waldron, Mark Watson, Scott Weidle, Anthony Wilson, Paul Winger, Robert Wood, Myra Wynn, Tiffany Zerangue. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Notice, #6 Declaration)(Kreep, Gary) (anh).
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smy1)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACASDC-16558020.), filed by Sam Lopez, Heidi Fernandez, Lindsay Liberto, Jared Dominick, Stephanie Caligiuri, John Randall, Douglas Hart, Teresa Dominick, Kevin Reberger, Dawnette Hunter, Yana Noyola, Matthew Gray, Susan Rogers, Naomi Chiba, Nicholas Christiansen, Jeff Ahlers, Joe Hanna, Douglas Perkins, Ricardo Chavez, Michelle Duncan, Roger Szelmeczka, Victor Thorne, Douglas Teachout, Mark Watson, Patrick Paeschke, Mohamad Bachrouche, Lance McDonald, Janet Friesz, Pamela Hartsock, Jennifer Fish, David Edewaard, Carol Reid, Trent Mooney, Gale Lyon, Logan Barnes, Jeff Neilson, Deanne Criswell, Jeffrey McCoy, Mary Ruth Edwards, Tim Solberg, Julia Myers, Scott Dawson, Mark Smith, Tiffany Zerangue, Morgan Magill, Nancy Scala, Robert Frey, Erika Jordan, Susan Bruyere, Bryan Raeder, Shad Davis, Rachel Waldron, Margaret Clark, Neil Custer, Jeff Jensen, Keira Taylor, Crystal Irvin, Josef Christ, James Booth, Marie Dreyer, Angelina Pinahardin, Matt Sterba, Dwight King, Chamise Hartman, Tony Savino, Anthony Dray, John Keisling, Jamie Heijamns, Jarrid Thomson, Samantha Keegan, James Snyder, Eva Upchurch, Jerry Gridley, Ramon Riojas, James Horton, Roger Graves, Sharon Freeland, Lisa McClain, Jason Kofoed, Keith Newberry, Myra Wynn, Ann Colt, Marguerite Hart, David Courret-Knight, Jennifer Roames, Shawn Danneker, Jeff Bohi, Corazon De Cristo Cano, Tim Moroney, John Caligiuri, Lisa Frost, Dorothy Frenzel, Kathyrn Draper, Anthony Wilson, Mischelle Russell, Randall Perkes, Gregg Dillingham, Paul Winger, Joelle Moss, Victor Tverdokhleb, Robert Wood, Tanya Allemang, Larry Herbert, John Grant, Terry Hardin, Brittany Skaar, Karen Shultz, Scott Weidle, Ron Irvin, Darryn Deline, Jeannette Sale, Matthew Reed, Tracey Rittenbach. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-193-CAB-AHG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Kreep, Gary)(smy1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Cristo Cano et al v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corazon De Cristo Cano
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Hardin
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Irvin
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Pinahardin
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette Sale
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Ahlers
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Allemang
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamad Bachrouche
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Barnes
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Bohi
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Booth
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bruyere
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Caligiuri
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Caligiuri
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Chavez
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Chiba
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josef Christ
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Christiansen
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Clark
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Colt
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Courret-Knight
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Custer
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Danneker
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shad Davis
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Dawson
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryn Deline
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Dillingham
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Dominick
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Dominick
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathyrn Draper
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dray
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Dreyer
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Duncan
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Edewaard
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ruth Edwards
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Fernandez
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Fish
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Frenzel
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Freeland
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Frey
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Friesz
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Frost
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Grant
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Graves
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Gray
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Gridley
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hanna
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Hart
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marguerite Hart
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chamise Hartman
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Hartsock
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Heijamns
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Herbert
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Horton
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawnette Hunter
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Irvin
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Keegan
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Keisling
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Jensen
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight King
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Jordan
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Kofoed
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Liberto
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Lopez
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale Lyon
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Magill
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa McClain
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey McCoy
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance McDonald
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trent Mooney
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Moroney
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joelle Moss
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Myers
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Neilson
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Newberry
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yana Noyola
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Paeschke
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Perkes
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Perkins
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Raeder
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Randall
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Reberger
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Reid
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Riojas
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Reed
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Rittenbach
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Roames
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Rogers
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mischelle Russell
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Savino
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Scala
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Shultz
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Skaar
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Smith
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Snyder
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Solberg
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Sterba
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keira Taylor
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Szelmeczka
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Teachout
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrid Thomson
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Thorne
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Tverdokhleb
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Upchurch
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Waldron
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Watson
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Weidle
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Wilson
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Winger
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wood
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra Wynn
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Zerangue
Represented By: Gary George Kreep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Valerie Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safer Federal Workforce Task Force
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Office of Personnel Management
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiran Ahuja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Services Administration
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Zients
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle P. Walensky
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanne Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric L. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Management and Budget
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalanda Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?