Mayor and City Council v. Alex Azar, II
Defendant / Appellant: OFFICE OF POPULATION AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, ALEX M. AZAR, II, in his official capacity as the Secretary of Health and Human Services and DIANE FOLEY, M.D., in her official capacity as the Deputy Assistant Secretary, Office of Population Affairs
Plaintiff / Appellee: MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE
Amicus Curiae: SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE, UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM, ALABAMA, COMMUNITY CATALYST, FAMILY EQUALITY COUNCIL, NATIONAL ABORTION FEDERATION, WHITMAN-WALKER HEALTH, KANSAS, TENNESSEE, ADVOCATES FOR YOUTH, THE LGBT MOVEMENT ADVANCEMENT PROJECT, IN OUR OWN VOICE: NATIONAL BLACK WOMEN'S REPRODUCTIVE JUSTICE AGENDA, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, NATIONAL HEALTH LAW PROGRAM, LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INCORPORATED, BAY AREA LAWYERS FOR INDIVIDUAL FREEDOM, NEW YORK, NEW YORK CITY HEALTH + 10 LOCAL GOVERNMENTS, CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS, TEXAS, POWER TO DECIDE, THE LEADERSHIP CONFERENCE ON CIVIL AND HUMAN RIGHTS, JUVENILE LAW CENTER, SEXUALITY INFORMATION AND EDUCATION COUNCIL OF THE UNITED STATES, THE INSTITUTE FOR POLICY INTEGRITY AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW, OKLAHOMA, AMERICAN MEDICAL STUDENT ASSOCIATION, NORTHWEST HEALTH LAW ADVOCATES, THE HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN, OHIO, UNITE FOR REPRODUCTIVE & GENDER EQUITY, YWCA OF THE USA, ARKANSAS, NATIONAL LGBTQ TASK FORCE, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE, GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBT EQUALITY, NATIONAL IMMIGRATION LAW CENTER, SOUTH DAKOTA, THE ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, WEST VIRGINIA, WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM, FAMILIES USA, THE NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY, EQUALITY FEDERATION, NEBRASKA, TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER, HIV MEDICINE ASSOCIATION, INDIANA, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, WOMENHEART, GLBTQ LEGAL ADVOCATES & DEFENDERS, NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, NARAL PRO-CHOICE AMERICA, NATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH, NATIONAL WOMEN'S HEALTH NETWORK, LOUISIANA, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, NATIONAL CENTER FOR YOUTH LAW, POSITIVE WOMEN'S NETWORK-USA, NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN, SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL FETAL MEDICINE, SOUTH CAROLINA, NATIONAL LATINA INSTITUTE FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH, UTAH and NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS
Case Number: 19-1614
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 2, 2019 Mayor and City Council v. Alex Azar, II
March 30, 2020 Mayor and City Council of Balt v. Alex Azar, II
March 31, 2020 Mayor and City of Balt v. Alex Azar, II
September 3, 2020 Summary Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. Azar

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 59 Three additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Alabama, Arkansas, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah and West Virginia. [19-1614] AD [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:28 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 55 COPY FOLLOW-UP NOTICE issued to Alabama, Arkansas, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virginia and Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., Office of Population Affairs and HHS requesting three additional copies of Opening Brief, Joint Appendix and Amicus Brief. Additional copies due No Later Then: 08/12/2019. [19-1614] AD [Entered: 08/07/2019 09:37 AM]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER filed [1000561746] granting mtion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 51 ]. Amicus brief due: Amicus brief due 08/21/2019. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? N/A. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. [19-1614] TW [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:31 PM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE ISSUED to Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., Office of Population Affairs and HHS requesting response to motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 51 ]. Response due: 08/13/2019.[1000561554]. [19-1614] TW [Entered: 08/06/2019 01:56 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 58 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 50 ] by National Center for Youth Law. . Number of pages: [28]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 08/08/2019. [1000563584] [19-1614] JR [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:04 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 57 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 48 ] by Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom, Equality Federation, Family Equality Council, GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality, HIV Medicine Association, Human Rights Campaign, LAMBDA Legal Defense and Education Fund, Incorporated, National Center for Lesbian Rights, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, Sexuality Information and Education Council of the United States, The LGBT Movement Advancement Project and Transgender Law Center. . Number of pages: [36]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 08/08/2019. [1000563130] [19-1614] JR [Entered: 08/08/2019 10:26 AM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 56 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 53 ] by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health and Medicine and Society for Maternal Fetal Medicine. . Number of pages: [30]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 08/07/2019. [1000562263] [19-1614] JR [Entered: 08/07/2019 11:07 AM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 53 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health and Medicine and Society for Maternal Fetal Medicine in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 08/05/2019. [1000561570] [19-1614] TW [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:10 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION by Amici Curiae American College of Obstetricians And Gynecologists, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health and Medicine, and Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine to file amicus curiae brief with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 08/05/2019 ecf. [1000560733] [19-1614] Douglas Hallward-Driemeier [Entered: 08/05/2019 08:58 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 50 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by National Center for Youth Law, Amicus Supporting Plaintiff-Appellee in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 08/06/2019. [1000560686] [19-1614] Bina Patel [Entered: 08/05/2019 05:18 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 49 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 08/06/2019. [1000560629] [19-1614] Bethany Davis Noll [Entered: 08/05/2019 04:36 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 48 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by National Center for Lesbian Rights, Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom, Equality Federation, Family Equality Council, GLMA, The National LGBTQ Task Force, The LGBT Movement Advancement Project, et al. in Support of Plaintiff-Appellees in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 08/05/2019. [1000560552] [19-1614] James Hough [Entered: 08/05/2019 04:06 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 47 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by National Health Law Program, Advocates for Youth, Am. Med. Student Ass'n, Community Catalyst, The Endrocrine Society, Families USA, et al., Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 08/05/2019. [1000560413] [19-1614] Martha Perkins [Entered: 08/05/2019 02:30 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 46 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by City of New York and local governments, amicus supporting appellee in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 08/05/2019. [1000560207] [19-1614] MacKenzie Fillow [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:09 PM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 45 Receipt of paper copy of RESPONSE BRIEF filed at [ # 44 ] by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. Number of pages: [85]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 07/31/2019. [1000557540] [19-1614] JR [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:27 AM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 44 BRIEF by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/30/2019. [1000556235] [19-1614] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:32 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore to response [ # 36 ].. [19-1614] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 07/22/2019 08:17 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 42 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. Counsel arguing: Andrew T. Tutt . [1000550850] [19-1614] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:58 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 41 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., HHS and Office of Population Affairs. Counsel arguing: Jaynie Lilley Opening argument time: 15 Rebuttal argument time: 5 . [1000550836] [19-1614] Jaynie Lilley [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:49 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE ISSUED to Mayor and City Council of Baltimore requesting reply to response [ # 36 ].[1000550591] [19-1614] JR [Entered: 07/19/2019 11:07 AM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 39 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Ohio, Alabama, Arkansas, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah and West Virginia. Counsel arguing: Benjamin M. Flowers . [1000550207] [19-1614] Benjamin Flowers [Entered: 07/18/2019 04:00 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 38 COURT ORDER filed [1000550119] granting Motion to participate in oral argument [ # 37 ]. Copies to all parties. [19-1614] CB [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:14 PM]
July 16, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION by Ohio, Alabama, Arkansas, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah and West Virginia to participate in oral argument. Date and method of service: 07/16/2019 ecf. [1000548044] [19-1614] Benjamin Flowers [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:27 PM]
July 12, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., HHS and Office of Population Affairs to Motion [ # 27 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [19-1614] Jaynie Lilley [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:20 PM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 35 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 09/18/2019. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 10 days. [19-1614] JLC [Entered: 07/09/2019 04:28 PM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE ISSUED to Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., Office of Population Affairs and HHS requesting response to Motion for rehearing en banc [ # 27 ]. Response due: 07/12/2019.[1000543637] [19-1614] JR [Entered: 07/09/2019 11:34 AM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 33 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Suzanne Sangree for Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. [1000543029] [19-1614] Suzanne Sangree [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:00 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 29 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., HHS and Office of Population Affairs. [19-1614] Jaynie Lilley [Entered: 07/05/2019 03:29 PM]
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER filed [1000542073] granting filing of amicus curiae brief. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? N/A. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. [19-1614] JR [Entered: 07/05/2019 09:36 AM]
July 3, 2019 Filing 30 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 26 ] by Alabama, Arkansas, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah and West Virginia. Number of pages: [34]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 07/05/2019. [1000542492] [19-1614] JR [Entered: 07/08/2019 07:30 AM]
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 PETITION for rehearing en banc by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. [19-1614] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 07/03/2019 07:01 PM]
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by State of Ohio and Amici States in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/03/2019. [1000541662] [19-1614] Benjamin Flowers [Entered: 07/03/2019 01:51 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 Accelerated BRIEFING ORDER filed. Response Brief due 07/29/2019. Reply brief due 8/19/19. [19-1614] JR [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:19 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 COURT ORDER filed [1000540755] granting Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 10 ] Is oral argument requested: Yes Copies to all parties. [19-1614] JR [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:16 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 COURT ORDER filed [1000540749] granting Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 9 ]. Copies to all parties. [19-1614] JR [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:14 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY by Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., HHS and Office of Population Affairs to response [ # 15 ], Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 9 ].. [19-1614] Jaynie Lilley [Entered: 07/01/2019 09:25 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., HHS and Office of Population Affairs that a reply will be filed. [1000538815].. [19-1614] Jaynie Lilley [Entered: 06/28/2019 01:30 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Faren M. Tang for Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. [1000538579] [19-1614] Faren Tang [Entered: 06/28/2019 09:37 AM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 32 Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 17 ] by Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., Office of Population Affairs and HHS. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [1]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [287]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 07/01/2019. [1000542587] [19-1614] JR [Entered: 07/08/2019 08:58 AM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 31 Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 18 ] by Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., Office of Population Affairs and HHS. Number of pages: [165]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 07/01/2019. [1000542585] [19-1614] JR [Entered: 07/08/2019 08:57 AM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF by Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., HHS and Office of Population Affairs in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/28/2019. [1000538390] [19-1614] Jaynie Lilley [Entered: 06/27/2019 07:35 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., HHS and Office of Population Affairs. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 06/28/2019. [1000538389] [19-1614] Jaynie Lilley [Entered: 06/27/2019 07:33 PM]
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore to Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 10 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [19-1614] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 06/26/2019 08:42 PM]
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 9 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [19-1614] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 06/26/2019 08:38 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephanie Toti for Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. [1000535022] [19-1614] Stephanie Toti [Entered: 06/21/2019 07:41 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 Amended NOTICE ISSUED to Mayor and City Council of Baltimore requesting response to Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 10 ]. Response due: 06/26/2019.[1000534668]. Mailed to: Tarra DeShields Minnis, Faren M. Tang, Marisa White. [19-1614] JR [Entered: 06/21/2019 10:55 AM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE ISSUED to Mayor and City Council of Baltimore requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 9 ]. Response due: 06/26/2019.[1000534664]. Mailed to: Tarra DeShields Minnis, Faren M. Tang, Marisa White. [19-1614] JR [Entered: 06/21/2019 10:50 AM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE ISSUED to Mayor and City Council of Baltimore requesting response to Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 10 ]. Response due: 07/01/2019.[1000534526]. Mailed to: Tarra DeShields Minnis, Faren M. Tang, Marisa White. [19-1614] JR [Entered: 06/21/2019 08:32 AM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., HHS and Office of Population Affairs to accelerate case processing.. Date and method of service: 06/20/2019 ecf. [1000534437] [19-1614] Jaynie Lilley [Entered: 06/20/2019 05:04 PM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., HHS and Office of Population Affairs for stay pending appeal. Date of action to be stayed, if applicable:May 30, 2019 Order.. Date and method of service: 06/20/2019 ecf. [1000534434] [19-1614] Jaynie Lilley [Entered: 06/20/2019 04:57 PM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tarra DeShields-Minnis for Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D. and HHS. [1000533847] [19-1614] Tarra Deshields [Entered: 06/20/2019 10:37 AM]
June 16, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Drew A. Harker for Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. [1000530849] [19-1614] Drew Harker [Entered: 06/16/2019 08:46 PM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew T. Tutt for Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. [1000529947] [19-1614] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 06/13/2019 02:50 PM]
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brinton Lucas for Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., HHS and Office of Population Affairs. [1000528823] [19-1614] Gerald Lucas [Entered: 06/12/2019 10:38 AM]
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jaynie Lilley for Alex M. Azar, II, Diane Foley, M.D., HHS and Office of Population Affairs. [1000528256] [19-1614] Jaynie Lilley [Entered: 06/11/2019 12:22 PM]
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Priscilla J Smith for Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. [1000527619] [19-1614] Priscilla Smith [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:19 PM]
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01103-RDB. Mailed to: Bradley Philip Humphreys, Robert Charles Merritt, Tarra DeShields Minnis, Faren M. Tang, Marisa White. [19-1614] JR [Entered: 06/10/2019 02:19 PM]
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01103-RDB. Case manager: JRice. [19-1614] JR [Entered: 06/10/2019 01:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mayor and City Council v. Alex Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OFFICE OF POPULATION AFFAIRS
Represented By: Tarra DeShields Minnis
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Jaynie Lilley
Represented By: Michael Raab
Represented By: Tarra Deshields Esq.
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Gerald Brinton Lucas
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Tarra DeShields Minnis
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Jaynie Lilley
Represented By: Michael Raab
Represented By: Tarra Deshields Esq.
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Gerald Brinton Lucas
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, in his official capacity as the Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Tarra DeShields Minnis
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Jaynie Lilley
Represented By: Michael Raab
Represented By: Tarra Deshields Esq.
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Gerald Brinton Lucas
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DIANE FOLEY, M.D., in her official capacity as the Deputy Assistant Secretary, Office of Population Affairs
Represented By: Tarra DeShields Minnis
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Jaynie Lilley
Represented By: Michael Raab
Represented By: Tarra Deshields Esq.
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Gerald Brinton Lucas
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE
Represented By: Drew A. Harker
Represented By: Andre M. Davis
Represented By: Priscilla Joyce Smith
Represented By: Marisa White
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: Allyson Himelfarb
Represented By: Stephanie Toti
Represented By: Faren M. Tang
Represented By: Suzanne Sangree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Andrew J. Sutton
Represented By: Daniel W. Richards
Represented By: Amy W. Malone
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Represented By: Lisa H. Bebchick
Represented By: Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ALABAMA
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Steven T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMUNITY CATALYST
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FAMILY EQUALITY COUNCIL
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ABORTION FEDERATION
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WHITMAN-WALKER HEALTH
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KANSAS
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Derek Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TENNESSEE
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Herbert H. Slatery III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ADVOCATES FOR YOUTH
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE LGBT MOVEMENT ADVANCEMENT PROJECT
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IN OUR OWN VOICE: NATIONAL BLACK WOMEN'S REPRODUCTIVE JUSTICE AGENDA
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Andrew J. Sutton
Represented By: Daniel W. Richards
Represented By: Amy W. Malone
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Represented By: Lisa H. Bebchick
Represented By: Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL HEALTH LAW PROGRAM
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BAY AREA LAWYERS FOR INDIVIDUAL FREEDOM
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW YORK, NEW YORK CITY HEALTH + 10 LOCAL GOVERNMENTS
Represented By: Melanie Ash
Represented By: Barbara J. Parker
Represented By: Danielle L. Goldstein
Represented By: Mark A. Flessner
Represented By: Collyn Peddie
Represented By: Angela Wheeler
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Represented By: Peter S. Holmes
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing
Represented By: Jamison Davies
Represented By: Judith L. Ramsey
Represented By: James R. Williams
Represented By: Philippa M. Guthrie
Represented By: Zach Klein
Represented By: Claude S. Platton
Represented By: Benna Ruth Solomon
Represented By: MacKenzie Fillow
Represented By: Michael N. Feuer
Represented By: Ronald C. Lewis
Represented By: Dennis J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TEXAS
Represented By: Ken Paxton
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: POWER TO DECIDE
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE LEADERSHIP CONFERENCE ON CIVIL AND HUMAN RIGHTS
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JUVENILE LAW CENTER
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SEXUALITY INFORMATION AND EDUCATION COUNCIL OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE INSTITUTE FOR POLICY INTEGRITY AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW
Represented By: Jason Schwartz
Represented By: Richard L. Revesz
Represented By: Bethany Davis Noll Esq.
Represented By: Madison Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OKLAHOMA
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Mike Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN MEDICAL STUDENT ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NORTHWEST HEALTH LAW ADVOCATES
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OHIO
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Stephen P. Carney
Represented By: Dave Yost
Represented By: Jason D. Manion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITE FOR REPRODUCTIVE & GENDER EQUITY
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: YWCA OF THE USA
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ARKANSAS
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Leslie Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL LGBTQ TASK FORCE
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBT EQUALITY
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL IMMIGRATION LAW CENTER
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTH DAKOTA
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Jason Ravnsborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE ENDOCRINE SOCIETY
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By: Patrick Morrisey
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FAMILIES USA
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EQUALITY FEDERATION
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEBRASKA
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TRANSGENDER LAW CENTER
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HIV MEDICINE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INDIANA
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Curtis T. Hill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Andrew J. Sutton
Represented By: Daniel W. Richards
Represented By: Amy W. Malone
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Represented By: Lisa H. Bebchick
Represented By: Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMENHEART
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLBTQ LEGAL ADVOCATES & DEFENDERS
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NARAL PRO-CHOICE AMERICA
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL WOMEN'S HEALTH NETWORK
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LOUISIANA
Represented By: Jeff Landry
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Andrew J. Sutton
Represented By: Daniel W. Richards
Represented By: Amy W. Malone
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Represented By: Lisa H. Bebchick
Represented By: Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CENTER FOR YOUTH LAW
Represented By: Bina Girish Patel
Represented By: David Denton Doak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: POSITIVE WOMEN'S NETWORK-USA
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY FOR MATERNAL FETAL MEDICINE
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Andrew J. Sutton
Represented By: Daniel W. Richards
Represented By: Amy W. Malone
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Represented By: Lisa H. Bebchick
Represented By: Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL LATINA INSTITUTE FOR REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UTAH
Represented By: Sean Reyes
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: James E. Hough
Represented By: Julianna Gonen
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?