July 18, 2018 |
Filing 54
STIPULATION of Dismissal by all parties by LEANDRA ENGLISH. (Gupta, Deepak)
|
July 16, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the dismissal of Plaintiff's appeal by the Court of Appeals at Plaintiff's request #53 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by July 30, 2018, unless a notice of dismissal is filed before that time. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/16/2018.(lctjk1)
|
July 13, 2018 |
Filing 53
MANDATE of USCA as to #48 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by LEANDRA ENGLISH ; USCA Case Number 18-5007. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(ztd)
|
February 8, 2018 |
Filing 52
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY, DONALD JOHN TRUMP. Attorney Matthew Joseph Berns terminated. (Berns, Matthew)
|
February 1, 2018 |
Filing 51
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re Minute Order granting Motion to Stay Pending Appeal; USCA Case Number 18-5007. (znmw)
|
January 30, 2018 |
Filing 50
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY, DONALD JOHN TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew)
|
January 30, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #50 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending a decision from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit on Plaintiff's appeal of the Court's #47 Order of January 10, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days of the decision. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/30/2018. (lctjk1)
|
January 12, 2018 |
USCA Case Number 18-5007 for #48 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by LEANDRA ENGLISH. (zrdj)
|
January 12, 2018 |
Filing 49
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #48 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (jf)
|
January 12, 2018 |
Filing 48
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #47 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by LEANDRA ENGLISH. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5285487. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit District Court Memorandum Opinion and Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
|
January 10, 2018 |
Filing 47
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/10/2018. (lctjk1)
|
January 9, 2018 |
Filing 46
TRANSCRIPT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING before Judge Timothy J. Kelly held on 12-22-2017; Page Numbers: 1-87; Date of Issuance: 1-9-2018; Court Reporter/Transcriber: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone number (202) 354-3111, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the < < <<
< < Redaction Request due 1/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2018.(Miller, Timothy)
|
December 22, 2017 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Motion Hearing held on 12/22/2017 re #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LEANDRA ENGLISH. Oral arguments heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (kh)
|
December 21, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniel Townsend is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/21/2017. (lctjk1)
|
December 20, 2017 |
Filing 45
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel Townsend, :Firm- Gupta Wessler PLLC, :Address- daniel@guptawessler.com. Phone No. - 2028881741. Fax No. - 2028887792 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5257815. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LEANDRA ENGLISH (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Townsend)(Gupta, Deepak)
|
December 20, 2017 |
Filing 44
REPLY to opposition to motion re #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LEANDRA ENGLISH. (Gupta, Deepak)
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing 43
AMICUS BRIEF by STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NEBRASKA. (jf)
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing 42
AMICUS BRIEF by CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (jf)
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing 41
RESPONSE re #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY, DONALD JOHN TRUMP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Berns, Matthew)
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing 40
MOTION for Leave to File by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Amici Curiae Texas et al, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Keller, Scott)
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing 39
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to File Amicus Curiae Brief Supporting Defendants by THE CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Law of the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America as Amicus Curiae Supporting Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
|
December 18, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, the #39 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that the amicus curiae brief (ECF No. 39-1) shall be deemed filed as of December 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/18/2017. (lctjk1)
|
December 18, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, the #40 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae. It is hereby ORDERED that the amici curiae brief (ECF No. 40-1) shall be deemed filed as of December 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/18/2017. (lctjk1)
|
December 14, 2017 |
Filing 38
AMICUS BRIEF by CREDIT UNION NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, INC. (znmw)
|
December 14, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, the #37 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that the amicus curiae brief (ECF No. 37-1) shall be deemed filed as of December 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/14/2017. (lctjk1)
|
December 12, 2017 |
Filing 37
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by CREDIT UNION NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Flo, Theodore)
|
December 11, 2017 |
Filing 36
AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICANS FOR FINANCIAL REFORM, CENTER FOR RESPONSIBLE LENDING, CONSUMER ACTION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CONSUMER ADVOCATES, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL CONSUMERS LEAGUE, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC., TZEDEK DC, INC., UNITED STATES PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP EDUCATION FUND, INC. (nunc pro tunc 12/08/2017) (jf)
|
December 11, 2017 |
Filing 33
AMICUS BRIEF by PETER CONTI-BROWN. (nunc pro tunc 12/08/2017) (jf)
|
December 11, 2017 |
Filing 32
AMICUS BRIEF by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CALIFORNIA, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, HAWAII, ILLINOIS, IOWA, MAINE, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, MINNESOTA, NEW MEXICO, NEW YORK, OREGON, PENNSYLVANIA, RHODE ISLAND, VERMONT, WASHINGTON (nunc pro tunc 12/08/2017) (jf)
|
December 11, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc, and for good cause shown, the #29 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Current and Former Members of Congress as Amici Curiae. It is hereby ORDERED that the amici curiae brief (ECF No. 29-1) shall be deemed filed as of December 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/11/2017. (lctjk1)
|
December 11, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc, and for good cause shown, the #30 Consent Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that the amicus curiae brief (ECF No. 30-1) shall be deemed filed as of December 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/11/2017. (lctjk1)
|
December 11, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc, and for good cause shown, the #31 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae. It is hereby ORDERED that the amici curiae brief (ECF No. 31-1) shall be deemed filed as of December 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/11/2017. (lctjk1)
|
December 8, 2017 |
Filing 35
AMICUS BRIEF by ETHAN S BERNSTEIN, BENJAMIN P. EDWARDS, KATHLEEN C. ENGEL, ROBERT HOCKETT, DALIE JIMENEZ, ADAM J. LEVITIN, PATRICIA A. MCCOY, CHRISTOPHER LEWIS PETERSON, JEFF SOVERN, ARTHUR E. WILLMARTH, JR. (nunc pro tunc 12/08/2017) (jf)
|
December 8, 2017 |
Filing 34
AMICUS BRIEF by JOYCE BEATTY, SHERROD BROWN, MICHAEL CAPUANO, WILLIAM "LACY" CLAY, JR, EMANUEL CLEAVER, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, CHARLIE CRIST, JOSEPH CROWLEY, JOHN K. DELANEY, CHRISTOPHER DODD, KEITH ELLISON, BILL FOSTER, BARNEY FRANK, AL GREEN, DENNY HECK, JIM HIMES, MAZIE K. HIRONO, STENY HOYER, TIM JOHNSON, PAUL E. KANJORSKI, DAN KILDEE, STEPHEN F. LYNCH, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, GREGORY W. MEEKS, BOB MENENDEZ, JEFF MERKLEY, BRAD MILLER, GWEN S. MOORE, NANCY PELOSI, BRIAN SCHATZ, CHARLES E. SCHUMER, BRAD SHERMAN, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, JUAN VARGAS, NYDIA VELAZQUEZ, ELIZABETH WARREN, MAXINE WATERS. (nunc pro tunc 12/08/2017)(jf)
|
December 8, 2017 |
Filing 31
MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CALIFORNIA, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, HAWAII, ILLINOIS, IOWA, MAINE, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, MINNESOTA, NEW MEXICO, NEW YORK, OREGON, PENNSYLVANIA, RHODE ISLAND, VERMONT, WASHINGTON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Amici Curiae In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction)(Schifferle, Carl)
|
December 8, 2017 |
Filing 30
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Peter Conti-Brown (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Haac, Anna)
|
December 8, 2017 |
Filing 29
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Current and Former Members of Congress as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by SHERROD BROWN, MICHAEL CAPUANO, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, CHARLIE CRIST, JOHN K. DELANEY, KEITH ELLISON, BILL FOSTER, BARNEY FRANK, DENNY HECK, JIM HIMES, STENY HOYER, DAN KILDEE, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, BOB MENENDEZ, GWEN S. MOORE, NANCY PELOSI, BRIAN SCHATZ, CHARLES E. SCHUMER, BRAD SHERMAN, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, JUAN VARGAS, NYDIA VELAZQUEZ, ELIZABETH WARREN, MAXINE WATERS, JOYCE BEATTY, WILLIAM "LACY" CLAY, JR, EMANUEL CLEAVER, JOSEPH CROWLEY, CHRISTOPHER DODD, AL GREEN, MAZIE K. HIRONO, TIM JOHNSON, PAUL E. KANJORSKI, STEPHEN F. LYNCH, GREGORY W. MEEKS, JEFF MERKLEY, BRAD MILLER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gorod, Brianne)
|
December 8, 2017 |
Filing 28
MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Consumer Finance Regulation Scholars in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by ETHAN S BERNSTEIN, BENJAMIN P. EDWARDS, KATHLEEN C. ENGEL, ROBERT HOCKETT, DALIE JIMENEZ, ADAM J. LEVITIN, PATRICIA A. MCCOY, CHRISTOPHER LEWIS PETERSON, JEFF SOVERN, ARTHUR E. WILLMARTH, JR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Brief of Amicus Curiae Consumer Finance Regulation Scholars)(Weiner, Courtney)
|
December 8, 2017 |
Filing 27
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Public Citizen, Inc., AMERICANS FOR FINANCIAL REFORM, CENTER FOR RESPONSIBLE LENDING, CONSUMER ACTION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CONSUMER ADVOCATES, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL CONSUMERS LEAGUE, national fair housing alliance, Tzedek DC, Inc., United States Public Interest Research Group Education Fund, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed amicus brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smullin, Rebecca)
|
December 8, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, the #27 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae. It is hereby ORDERED that the amici curiae brief (ECF No. 27-1) shall be deemed filed as of December 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/8/2017. (lctjk1)
|
December 8, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, the #28 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae. It is hereby ORDERED that the amicus curiae brief (ECF No. 28-2) shall be deemed filed as of December 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/8/2017. (lctjk1)
|
December 7, 2017 |
Filing 26
ERRATA (CORRECTED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION) by LEANDRA ENGLISH #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LEANDRA ENGLISH. (Gupta, Deepak)
|
December 7, 2017 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #25 Memorandum; emailed to deepak@guptawessler.com, cc'd 27 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. In future, the memorandum in support and affidavits/exhibits should be attached to the motion docket entry, not filed separately. Do not refile. (znmw, )
|
December 6, 2017 |
Filing 25
MEMORANDUM re #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LEANDRA ENGLISH by LEANDRA ENGLISH. (Gupta, Deepak)
|
December 6, 2017 |
Filing 24
AFFIDAVIT re #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LEANDRA ENGLISH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Memorandum of Director Richard Cordray), #2 Exhibit B (Resignation Letter from Director Richard Cordray), #3 Exhibit C (White House Press Statement))(Gupta, Deepak)
|
December 6, 2017 |
Filing 23
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LEANDRA ENGLISH (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
|
December 6, 2017 |
Filing 22
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by LEANDRA ENGLISH.(Gupta, Deepak)
|
December 5, 2017 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/5/2017. Scheduling Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (kh)
|
December 5, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's scheduling conference, it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff shall file her motion for preliminary injunction by December 6, 2017; (2) Any amicus curiae briefs in support of Plaintiff's motion shall be filed by December 8, 2017; (3) Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiff's motion by December 18, 2017 at 1:00 p.m.; (4) Any amicus curiae briefs in support of Defendants' opposition shall be filed by December 18, 2017 at 1:00 p.m.; (5) Plaintiff shall file her reply in support of her motion by December 20, 2017 at 1:00 p.m.; and (6) A hearing on the motion is set for December 22, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/5/2017. (lctjk1)
|
December 4, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Rachel S. Bloomekatz is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/4/2017. (lctjk1)
|
December 4, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joshua Matz is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/4/2017. (lctjk1)
|
December 4, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the separate proposed briefing schedules submitted by the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a scheduling conference tomorrow, December 5, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/4/2017. (lctjk1)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing 21
PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by LEANDRA ENGLISH. (Gupta, Deepak)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing 20
PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY, DONALD JOHN TRUMP. (Berns, Matthew)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing 19
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joshua Matz, :Firm- Gupta Wessler PLLC, :Address- joshua@guptawessler.com. Phone No. - 2028881741. Fax No. - 2028887792 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5229965. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LEANDRA ENGLISH (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Joshua Matz)(Gupta, Deepak)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing 18
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel Bloomekatz, :Firm- Gupta Wessler PLLC, :Address- rachel@guptawessler.com. Phone No. - 2028881741. Fax No. - 2028887792 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5229960. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LEANDRA ENGLISH (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rachel S. Bloomekatz)(Gupta, Deepak)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing 17
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY served on 12/1/2017; DONALD JOHN TRUMP served on 12/1/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/1/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/1/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/30/2018.) (Attachments: #1 USPS receipts and delivery information)(Gupta, Deepak)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing 16
TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Timothy J. Kelly held on 11-28-2017; Page Numbers: 1-37. Date of Issuance: 12-1-2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Timothy R. Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3111, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenc ed above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2018.(Miller, Timothy)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing 15
TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Timothy J. Kelly held on 11-27-2017; Page Numbers: 1-30. Date of Issuance: 12-1-2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Timothy R. Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3111, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenc ed above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2018.(Miller, Timothy)
|
November 29, 2017 |
Filing 14
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A. Shumate on behalf of All Defendants (Shumate, Brett)
|
November 29, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's #2 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the #11 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief is DENIED AS MOOT, without prejudice to re-filing for leave to file a brief with respect to the merits or any additional motions for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/29/2017. (lctjk1)
|
November 29, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: For reasons stated on the record at the hearing on November 28, 2017, Plaintiff's #12 Motion to treat her emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order as a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. To the extent that the Motion requests that the Court enter a briefing schedule on the merits, the Motion is DENIED without prejudice. The parties shall meet and confer, and submit, by December 1, 2017, a joint proposed schedule for briefing the merits and/or for briefing a preliminary injunction, should one be filed by Plaintiff by then. If the parties cannot agree on a joint proposed schedule, they shall submit separate proposed schedules. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/29/2017. (lctjk1)
|
November 29, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/1/2017. (kh)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing 12
MOTION Plaintiff's Scheduling Request by LEANDRA ENGLISH (Gupta, Deepak)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing 11
MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief of Texas et al., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Scott) Modified to add filers on 11/29/2017 (znmw).
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing 10
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Keller on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS (Keller, Scott)
|
November 28, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, the #6 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that the amici curiae brief (ECF No. 6-1) shall be deemed filed as of November 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/28/2017. (lctjk1)
|
November 28, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for a further hearing on the #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order today, November 28, 2017, at 4:00 p.m in Courtroom 11. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/28/2017. (lctjk1)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Minute Order and Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Motion Hearing held on 11/28/2017. Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Leandra English #2 DENIED for reasons stated on the record. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (kh)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing 13
AMICUS BRIEF by SHERROD BROWN, MICHAEL CAPUANO, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, CHARLIE CRIST, JOHN K. DELANEY, KEITH ELLISON, BILL FOSTER, BARNEY FRANK, VICENTE GONZALEZ, DENNY HECK, JIM HIMES, STENY HOYER, RUBEN J. KIHUEN, DAN KILDEE, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, BOB MENENDEZ, GWEN S. MOORE, NANCY PELOSI, BRIAN SCHATZ, CHARLES E. SCHUMER, BRAD SHERMAN, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, JUAN VARGAS, NYDIA VELAZQUEZ, ELIZABETH WARREN, MAXINE WATERS. (jf)
|
November 27, 2017 |
SUMMONS (4) Issued as to JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY, DONALD JOHN TRUMP, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing 9
Memorandum in opposition to re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY, DONALD JOHN TRUMP. (Takemoto, Benjamin)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing 8
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Thomas Takemoto on behalf of All Defendants (Takemoto, Benjamin)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing 7
ERRATA by LEANDRA ENGLISH. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Complaint, #2 Corrected Motion and Memorandum for Temporary Restraining Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing 6
MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by SHERROD BROWN, MICHAEL CAPUANO, CATHERINE CORTEZ MASTO, CHARLIE CRIST, John K. Delaney, KEITH ELLISON, Bill Foster, BARNEY FRANK, Denny Heck, Jim Himes, Ruben J. Kihuen, Dan Kildee, Carolyn B. Maloney, Bob Menendez, Gwen S. Moore, NANCY PELOSI, Brian Schatz, CHARLES E. SCHUMER, BRAD SHERMAN, CHRIS VAN HOLLEN, Juan Vargas, ELIZABETH WARREN, MAXINE WATERS, STENY HOYER, NYDIA VELAZQUEZ, Vicente Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gorod, Brianne)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing 5
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Joseph Berns on behalf of All Defendants (Berns, Matthew)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing 4
AFFIDAVIT OF DEEPAK GUPTA UNDER LOCAL RULE 65.1(B) by Leandra English. (Gupta, Deepak)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing 3
MEMORANDUM re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Leandra English by Leandra English. (Gupta, Deepak)
|
November 27, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for a hearing on Plaintiff's #2 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order today, November 27, 2017, at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11. If the parties wish to reschedule the hearing for a later date, they shall confer and jointly contact chambers today by 3:30 p.m. with a mutually agreed upon date and time. (lctjk1)
|
November 27, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that any opposition to the #6 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief shall be filed by tomorrow, November 28, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/27/2017. (lctjk1)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Motion Hearing held on 11/27/2017 re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by LEANDRA ENGLISH. Oral arguments heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (kh)
|
November 26, 2017 |
Filing 2
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Leandra English (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
|
November 26, 2017 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (EMERGENCY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SOUGHT) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5219866) filed by Leandra English. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Donald John Trump, #3 Summons Summons to John M. Mulvaney)(Gupta, Deepak)
|