M.M.V. et al v. BARR et al
Plaintiff: MMV, L.P.E., I.G., A.O.V., J.M.R., I.F.L., Y.J.T., M.V.C., J.A.L., J.T., H.M.M., N.M.L., I.G.L., F.G., M.A.A., ALL PLAINTIFFS, R.G.R., I.A.D., J.S.P., I.S.R., D.C.P., a minor E.P.C., L.A.C., D.B.G., C.L.A., N.C.A., E.G.G., D.S.P., Y.F.H., R.D.P., Y.O.T., a minor S.V.C., A.V.R., A.G.H., E.P.V., C.P.G., A.R.A., M. R.A., L.C.R., A.A.T., J.L.C., V.V.P., E.P.G., B.A.G., S.T.T., M.G.V., E.H.O., I.M.G., R.C.C., E.T.T., A.A.M., M.B.P., Y.U., B.S.C., I.A., J.C.P., M.M.V., D.M.G., M.U.G., M.F.L., M.P.C., G.A.Q., S.G.H., V.L.O., R.P.F., D.M.S., A.A.Q., L.H.H., S.V.C., N.A.Q., V.O.V., C.A.T., G.M.A., T.A.M., M.A.S., E.C.B., M.C.M., J.M.H., C.C.N., A.R.G., K.P.P., M.S.M., M.H., C.C.S., I.H.O., P.A., A.P.O., M.C.D., F.G.U., M.P.P., E.E.C., S.M.C., D.V.R., N.P., M.D.E., D.G.A., M.P.G., C.A.A., C.C.P., E.A.N., B.B.G., M.M.B., A.G.D., D.C.V., N.E.M., A.G.L., N.M.M., J.F.P., V.A.R., A.R.M., J.S.M., W.P.R., S.L.V., D.L.C., J.S.O., J.A.S., D.L.O., E.P.C., A.B.C., M.A.M., M.R.A., C.G.M., K.N.E., J.G.O., I.P.P., J.G.G., R.F.L., H.C.P., M.G.P., A.L.V. and L.O.R.
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, Andrew Davidson, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, Acting Commissioner MARK MORGAN, WILLIAM P. BARR, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, JAMES MCHENRY, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI and MARK MORGAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv02773
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by M.V.C., E.P.C. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
October 28, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was entered in error at the request of counsel and will be refiled.(jf)
October 28, 2019 Filing 36 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by M.V.C., D.C.V., S.V.C. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy) Modified on 10/28/2019 (jf).
October 24, 2019 Filing 35 Memorandum in opposition to re #29 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANDREW DAVIDSON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, MARK MORGAN. (Hair, Christopher)
October 22, 2019 Filing 34 SEALED Exhibits re #31 Response to Order of the Court filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
October 22, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by A.A.T., C.A.T., D.L.C., R.C.C. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #32 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file under seal the supplemental exhibits [32-1] [32-2] [32-3] in support of plaintiffs' response to the Court's Order to Show Cause #31 . SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/22/2019. (lcabj2)
October 21, 2019 Filing 32 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, Set Deadlines, to Show Cause filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
October 18, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by B.A.G., D.M.G., F.G., H.M.M., I.G., L.A.C., M.P.C., N.C.A., N.E.M., T.A.M. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court conducted a telephonic hearing at 10:15 pm on October 17, 2019 with the parties regarding plaintiffs' second motion for a temporary restraining order #29 . The motion to extend the Administrative Stay is granted. It is hereby ORDERED that the additional plaintiffs identified in the amended complaint #28 are subject to the Administrative Stay of Removal #16 entered by Judge Kentanji Brown Jackson on September 25, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher Cooper acting as the emergency motions judge, on behalf of Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/17/2019. (lcabj2)
October 17, 2019 Filing 29 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to identify which (not just how many) plaintiffs fall into each of the three categories identified on page six of the defendants' opposition to the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #26 , and further, to show cause by October 21, 2019, why the claims brought by any remaining plaintiffs in the first and second categories are ripe. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/15/2019. (lcabj2)
October 10, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Staying Removal filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 26 Memorandum in opposition to re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Staying Removal filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANDREW DAVIDSON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, MARK MORGAN. (Hair, Christopher)
October 3, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re D.V.R.; A.V.R., a minor; L.P.E.; C.C.P., a minor; D.C.P., a minor; V.O.V.; E.H.O., a minor; I.H.O., a minor; M.S.M.;C.C.S., a minor; J.G.O; I.M.G., a minor; D.C.V.; S.V.C., a minor; R.G.R.; D.B.G., a minor; B.B.G., a minor; P.A.; I.A., a minor; I.S.R.; J.A.S., a minor; M.G.P.; M.U.G., a minor; J.T.; Y.J.T., a minor; and J.L.C., a minor (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of All Defendants (Hair, Christopher)
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, ANDREW DAVIDSON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, MARK MORGAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf)
September 30, 2019 Filing 22 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by A.A.M., A.A.Q., A.A.T., A.B.C., A.G.D., A.G.H., A.G.L., A.L.V., A.O.V., A.P.O., A.R.A., A.R.G., A.R.M., A.V.R., ALL PLAINTIFFS, B.A.G., B.B.G., B.S.C., C.A.A., C.A.T., C.C.N., C.C.P., C.C.S., C.G.M., C.L.A., C.P.G., D.B.G., D.C.P., D.C.V., D.G.A., D.L.C., D.L.O., D.M.G., D.M.S., D.S.P., D.V.R., E.A.N., E.C.B., E.E.C., E.G.G., E.H.O., E.P.G., E.P.V., E.T.T., F.G., F.G.U., G.A.Q., G.M.A., H.C.P., H.M.M., I.A., I.A.D., I.F.L., I.G., I.G.L., I.H.O., I.M.G., I.P.P., I.S.R., J.A.L., J.A.S., J.C.P., J.F.P., J.G.G., J.G.O., J.L.C., J.M.H., J.M.R., J.S.M., J.S.O., J.S.P., J.T., K.N.E., K.P.P., L.A.C., L.C.R., L.H.H., L.O.R., L.P.E., M.A.A., M.A.M., M.A.S., M.B.P., M.C.D., M.C.M., M.D.E., M.F.L., M.G.P., M.G.V., M.H., M.M.B., M.M.V., M.P.C., M.P.G., M.P.P., M.R.A., M.S.M., M.U.G., M.V.C., N.A.Q., N.C.A., N.E.M., N.M.L., N.M.M., N.P., P.A., M. R.A., R.C.C., R.D.P., R.F.L., R.G.R., R.P.F., S.G.H., S.L.V., S.M.C., S.T.T., S.V.C., T.A.M., V.A.R., V.L.O., V.O.V., V.V.P., W.P.R., Y.F.H., Y.J.T., Y.O.T., Y.U. re #17 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Plaintiffs with Pseudonyms and A Numbers, #2 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
September 29, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elora Mukherjee, :Firm- Columbia Law School, :Address- 435 W. 116th St, New York NY 10027NY. Phone No. - 212.854.4291. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6404691. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.A.M., A.A.Q., A.A.T., A.B.C., A.G.D., A.G.H., A.G.L., A.L.V., A.O.V., A.P.O., A.R.A., A.R.G., A.R.M., A.V.R., ALL PLAINTIFFS, B.A.G., B.B.G., B.S.C., C.A.A., C.A.T., C.C.N., C.C.P., C.C.S., C.G.M., C.L.A., C.P.G., D.B.G., D.C.P., D.C.V., D.G.A., D.L.C., D.L.O., D.M.G., D.M.S., D.S.P., D.V.R., E.A.N., E.C.B., E.E.C., E.G.G., E.H.O., E.P.G., E.P.V., E.T.T., F.G., F.G.U., G.A.Q., G.M.A., H.C.P., H.M.M., I.A., I.A.D., I.F.L., I.G., I.G.L., I.H.O., I.M.G., I.P.P., I.S.R., J.A.L., J.A.S., J.C.P., J.F.P., J.G.G., J.G.O., J.L.C., J.M.H., J.M.R., J.S.M., J.S.O., J.S.P., J.T., K.N.E., K.P.P., L.A.C., L.C.R., L.H.H., L.O.R., L.P.E., M.A.A., M.A.M., M.A.S., M.B.P., M.C.D., M.C.M., M.D.E., M.F.L., M.G.P., M.G.V., M.H., M.M.B., M.M.V., M.P.C., M.P.G., M.P.P., M.R.A., M.S.M., M.U.G., M.V.C., N.A.Q., N.C.A., N.E.M., N.M.L., N.M.M., N.P., P.A., M. R.A., R.C.C., R.D.P., R.F.L., R.G.R., R.P.F., S.G.H., S.L.V., S.M.C., S.T.T., S.V.C., T.A.M., V.A.R., V.L.O., V.O.V., V.V.P., W.P.R., Y.F.H., Y.J.T., Y.O.T., Y.U. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Ahmad, Hassan)
September 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Telephone Scheduling Conference call held on 9/26/2019. Defendants' Response to that portion of the #13 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order that seeks a stay of defendants' removal from the United States is due by 10/3/2019, and plaintiffs' reply is due by 10/10/2019. The parties shall file a notice with the Court by 10/1/2019 of any changes in the matters to be briefed and, if needed, propose a revised briefing schedule. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
September 26, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #14 Errata; emailed to gregory@defensenetwork.org, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Please see LCvR 5.1 (a) Correspondence with the Court. (ztth, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 20 ERRATA Proposed Summonses for All Defendants + USADC by A.A.M., A.A.Q., A.A.T., A.B.C., A.G.D., A.G.H., A.G.L., A.L.V., A.O.V., A.P.O., A.R.A., A.R.G., A.R.M., A.V.R., B.A.G., B.B.G., B.S.C., C.A.A., C.A.T., C.C.N., C.C.P., C.C.S., C.G.M., C.L.A., C.P.G., D.B.G., D.C.P., D.C.V., D.G.A., D.L.C., D.L.O., D.M.G., D.M.S., D.S.P., D.V.R., E.A.N., E.C.B., E.E.C., E.G.G., E.H.O., E.P.G., E.P.V., E.T.T., F.G., F.G.U., G.A.Q., G.M.A., H.C.P., H.M.M., I.A., I.A.D., I.F.L., I.G., I.G.L., I.H.O., I.M.G., I.P.P., I.S.R., J.A.L., J.A.S., J.C.P., J.F.P., J.G.G., J.G.O., J.L.C., J.M.H., J.M.R., J.S.M., J.S.O., J.S.P., J.T., K.N.E., K.P.P., L.A.C., L.C.R., L.H.H., L.O.R., L.P.E., M.A.A., M.A.M., M.A.S., M.B.P., M.C.D., M.C.M., M.D.E., M.F.L., M.G.P., M.G.V., M.H., M.M.B., M.M.V., M.P.C., M.P.G., M.P.P., M.R.A., M.S.M., M.U.G., M.V.C., N.A.Q., N.C.A., N.E.M., N.M.L., N.M.M., N.P., P.A., M. R.A., R.C.C., R.D.P., R.F.L., R.G.R., R.P.F., S.G.H., S.L.V., S.M.C., S.T.T., S.V.C., T.A.M., V.A.R., V.L.O., V.O.V., V.V.P., W.P.R., Y.F.H., Y.J.T., Y.O.T., Y.U. #1 Complaint, filed by M.M.V.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Ahmad, Hassan);
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A.A.M., A.A.Q., A.A.T., A.B.C., A.G.D., A.G.H., A.G.L., A.L.V., A.O.V., A.P.O., A.R.A., A.R.G., A.R.M., A.V.R., B.A.G., B.B.G., B.S.C., C.A.A., C.A.T., C.C.N., C.C.P., C.C.S., C.G.M., C.L.A., C.P.G., D.B.G., D.C.P., D.C.V., D.G.A., D.L.C., D.L.O., D.M.G., D.M.S., D.S.P., D.V.R., E.A.N., E.C.B., E.E.C., E.G.G., E.H.O., E.P.G., E.P.V., E.T.T., F.G., F.G.U., G.A.Q., G.M.A., H.C.P., H.M.M., I.A., I.A.D., I.F.L., I.G., I.G.L., I.H.O., I.M.G., I.P.P., I.S.R., J.A.L., J.A.S., J.C.P., J.F.P., J.G.G., J.G.O., J.L.C., J.M.H., J.M.R., J.S.M., J.S.O., J.S.P., J.T., K.N.E., K.P.P., L.A.C., L.C.R., L.H.H., L.O.R., L.P.E., M.A.A., M.A.M., M.A.S., M.B.P., M.C.D., M.C.M., M.D.E., M.F.L., M.G.P., M.G.V., M.H., M.M.B., M.M.V., M.P.C., M.P.G., M.P.P., M.R.A., M.S.M., M.U.G., M.V.C., N.A.Q., N.C.A., N.E.M., N.M.L., N.M.M., N.P., P.A., M. R.A., R.C.C., R.D.P., R.F.L., R.G.R., R.P.F., S.G.H., S.L.V., S.M.C., S.T.T., S.V.C., T.A.M., V.A.R., V.L.O., V.O.V., V.V.P., W.P.R., Y.F.H., Y.J.T., Y.O.T., Y.U. re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Staying Removal, #1 Complaint, #18 Errata,,,,,,,,,, . (Copeland, Gregory)
September 26, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: A Telephone Scheduling Conference call is set for 9/26/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Counsel have been provided with both the toll free dial in telephone number and pass code to access the call. (jth)
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 ERRATA re: Memorandum of Points and Authorities by A.A.M., A.A.Q., A.A.T., A.B.C., A.G.D., A.G.H., A.G.L., A.L.V., A.O.V., A.P.O., A.R.A., A.R.G., A.R.M., A.V.R., B.A.G., B.B.G., B.S.C., C.A.A., C.A.T., C.C.N., C.C.P., C.C.S., C.G.M., C.L.A., C.P.G., D.B.G., D.C.P., D.C.V., D.G.A., D.L.C., D.L.O., D.M.G., D.M.S., D.S.P., D.V.R., E.A.N., E.C.B., E.E.C., E.G.G., E.H.O., E.P.G., E.P.V., E.T.T., F.G., F.G.U., G.A.Q., G.M.A., H.C.P., H.M.M., I.A., I.A.D., I.F.L., I.G., I.G.L., I.H.O., I.M.G., I.P.P., I.S.R., J.A.L., J.A.S., J.C.P., J.F.P., J.G.G., J.G.O., J.L.C., J.M.H., J.M.R., J.S.M., J.S.O., J.S.P., J.T., K.N.E., K.P.P., L.A.C., L.C.R., L.H.H., L.O.R., L.P.E., M.A.A., M.A.M., M.A.S., M.B.P., M.C.D., M.C.M., M.D.E., M.F.L., M.G.P., M.G.V., M.H., M.M.B., M.M.V., M.P.C., M.P.G., M.P.P., M.R.A., M.S.M., M.U.G., M.V.C., N.A.Q., N.C.A., N.E.M., N.M.L., N.M.M., N.P., P.A., M. R.A., R.C.C., R.D.P., R.F.L., R.G.R., R.P.F., S.G.H., S.L.V., S.M.C., S.T.T., S.V.C., T.A.M., V.A.R., V.L.O., V.O.V., V.V.P., W.P.R., Y.F.H., Y.J.T., Y.O.T., Y.U. #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Staying Removal filed by J.G.O., C.P.G., D.G.A., G.A.Q., C.A.A., C.L.A., J.S.M., L.C.R., N.C.A., A.A.M., A.G.L., M.G.P., M.C.D., V.A.R., J.S.O., J.L.C., S.V.C., J.M.H., I.A.D., E.H.O., S.L.V., A.G.D., A.R.A., A.V.R., G.M.A., I.F.L., R.C.C., D.M.G., W.P.R., M.B.P., M.F.L., A.G.H., S.M.C., E.G.G., L.O.R., M.S.M., J.F.P., T.A.M., I.G.L., J.T., L.P.E., V.O.V., C.A.T., A.R.G., Y.F.H., V.L.O., A.B.C., M. R.A., K.N.E., R.G.R., E.P.V., D.L.O., J.A.L., L.H.H., D.L.C., F.G.U., S.G.H., D.C.V., M.A.A., C.C.P., R.D.P., E.T.T., J.G.G., I.A., M.P.P., A.L.V., E.E.C., D.M.S., I.S.R., M.R.A., M.P.G., N.M.M., D.V.R., M.D.E., M.C.M., N.M.L., N.P., A.A.Q., P.A., H.C.P., C.C.N., J.M.R., F.G., A.R.M., J.C.P., K.P.P., J.S.P., M.U.G., M.M.B., Y.U., I.M.G., R.P.F., D.S.P., J.A.S., D.C.P., Y.O.T., B.S.C., B.B.G., M.P.C., M.A.M., Y.J.T., N.A.Q., M.A.S., S.T.T., C.C.S., A.O.V., I.G., D.B.G., H.M.M., L.A.C., E.A.N., C.G.M., E.C.B., M.H., N.E.M., B.A.G., M.V.C., I.P.P., A.P.O., M.G.V., R.F.L., V.V.P., A.A.T., M.M.V., E.P.G., I.H.O.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Exh. A, Correct Version of Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Copeland, Gregory)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 9/26/2019. (zeg)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave of Bridget Cambria Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and granting #8 Motion for Leave of Amy Maldonado to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyers admitted, or at least one member of the lawyers' firms, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/26/19. (DMK)
September 26, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Judge Timothy J. Kelly is no longer assigned to the case as deemed not related. (ztnr)
September 25, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to All Defendants. (znmw)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting temporary stay to preserve the status quo. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/25/2019. (lckbj2)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER reassigning case to Calendar and Case Management Committee. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/25/2019. (lctjk2)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA by A.A.M., A.A.Q., A.A.T., A.B.C., A.G.D., A.G.H., A.G.L., A.L.V., A.O.V., A.P.O., A.R.A., A.R.G., A.R.M., A.V.R., B.A.G., B.B.G., B.S.C., C.A.A., C.A.T., C.C.N., C.C.P., C.C.S., C.G.M., C.L.A., C.P.G., D.B.G., D.C.P., D.C.V., D.G.A., D.L.C., D.L.O., D.M.G., D.M.S., D.S.P., D.V.R., E.A.N., E.C.B., E.E.C., E.G.G., E.H.O., E.P.G., E.P.V., E.T.T., F.G., F.G.U., G.A.Q., G.M.A., H.C.P., H.M.M., I.A., I.A.D., I.F.L., I.G., I.G.L., I.H.O., I.M.G., I.P.P., I.S.R., J.A.L., J.A.S., J.C.P., J.F.P., J.G.G., J.G.O., J.L.C., J.M.H., J.M.R., J.S.M., J.S.O., J.S.P., J.T., K.N.E., K.P.P., L.A.C., L.C.R., L.H.H., L.O.R., L.P.E., M.A.A., M.A.M., M.A.S., M.B.P., M.C.D., M.C.M., M.D.E., M.F.L., M.G.P., M.G.V., M.H., M.M.B., M.M.V., M.P.C., M.P.G., M.P.P., M.R.A., M.S.M., M.U.G., M.V.C., N.A.Q., N.C.A., N.E.M., N.M.L., N.M.M., N.P., P.A., M. R.A., R.C.C., R.D.P., R.F.L., R.G.R., R.P.F., S.G.H., S.L.V., S.M.C., S.T.T., S.V.C., T.A.M., V.A.R., V.L.O., V.O.V., V.V.P., W.P.R., Y.F.H., Y.J.T., Y.O.T., Y.U. #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Staying Removal filed by J.G.O., C.P.G., D.G.A., G.A.Q., C.A.A., C.L.A., J.S.M., L.C.R., N.C.A., A.A.M., A.G.L., M.G.P., M.C.D., V.A.R., J.S.O., J.L.C., S.V.C., J.M.H., I.A.D., E.H.O., S.L.V., A.G.D., A.R.A., A.V.R., G.M.A., I.F.L., R.C.C., D.M.G., W.P.R., M.B.P., M.F.L., A.G.H., S.M.C., E.G.G., L.O.R., M.S.M., J.F.P., T.A.M., I.G.L., J.T., L.P.E., V.O.V., C.A.T., A.R.G., Y.F.H., V.L.O., A.B.C., M. R.A., K.N.E., R.G.R., E.P.V., D.L.O., J.A.L., L.H.H., D.L.C., F.G.U., S.G.H., D.C.V., M.A.A., C.C.P., R.D.P., E.T.T., J.G.G., I.A., M.P.P., A.L.V., E.E.C., D.M.S., I.S.R., M.R.A., M.P.G., N.M.M., D.V.R., M.D.E., M.C.M., N.M.L., N.P., A.A.Q., P.A., H.C.P., C.C.N., J.M.R., F.G., A.R.M., J.C.P., K.P.P., J.S.P., M.U.G., M.M.B., Y.U., I.M.G., R.P.F., D.S.P., J.A.S., D.C.P., Y.O.T., B.S.C., B.B.G., M.P.C., M.A.M., Y.J.T., N.A.Q., M.A.S., S.T.T., C.C.S., A.O.V., I.G., D.B.G., H.M.M., L.A.C., E.A.N., C.G.M., E.C.B., M.H., N.E.M., B.A.G., M.V.C., I.P.P., A.P.O., M.G.V., R.F.L., V.V.P., A.A.T., M.M.V., E.P.G., I.H.O.. (Copeland, Gregory) Modified on 9/26/2019 (ztth).
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Staying Removal by A.A.M., A.A.Q., A.A.T., A.B.C., A.G.D., A.G.H., A.G.L., A.L.V., A.O.V., A.P.O., A.R.A., A.R.G., A.R.M., A.V.R., B.A.G., B.B.G., B.S.C., C.A.A., C.A.T., C.C.N., C.C.P., C.C.S., C.G.M., C.L.A., C.P.G., D.B.G., D.C.P., D.C.V., D.G.A., D.L.C., D.L.O., D.M.G., D.M.S., D.S.P., D.V.R., E.A.N., E.C.B., E.E.C., E.G.G., E.H.O., E.P.G., E.P.V., E.T.T., F.G., F.G.U., G.A.Q., G.M.A., H.C.P., H.M.M., I.A., I.A.D., I.F.L., I.G., I.G.L., I.H.O., I.M.G., I.P.P., I.S.R., J.A.L., J.A.S., J.C.P., J.F.P., J.G.G., J.G.O., J.L.C., J.M.H., J.M.R., J.S.M., J.S.O., J.S.P., J.T., K.N.E., K.P.P., L.A.C., L.C.R., L.H.H., L.O.R., L.P.E., M.A.A., M.A.M., M.A.S., M.B.P., M.C.D., M.C.M., M.D.E., M.F.L., M.G.P., M.G.V., M.H., M.M.B., M.M.V., M.P.C., M.P.G., M.P.P., M.R.A., M.S.M., M.U.G., M.V.C., N.A.Q., N.C.A., N.E.M., N.M.L., N.M.M., N.P., P.A., M. R.A., R.C.C., R.D.P., R.F.L., R.G.R., R.P.F., S.G.H., S.L.V., S.M.C., S.T.T., S.V.C., T.A.M., V.A.R., V.L.O., V.O.V., V.V.P., W.P.R., Y.F.H., Y.J.T., Y.O.T., Y.U. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Memo in Support, Declarations)(Copeland, Gregory)
September 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Gregory P. Copeland on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Copeland, Gregory)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY re #3 Notice of Related Case, #4 Notice of Related Case filed by A.A.M., A.A.Q., A.A.T., A.B.C., A.G.D., A.G.H., A.G.L., A.L.V., A.O.V., A.P.O., A.R.A., A.R.G., A.R.M., A.V.R., B.A.G., B.B.G., B.S.C., C.A.A., C.A.T., C.C.N., C.C.P., C.C.S., C.G.M., C.L.A., C.P.G., D.B.G., D.C.P., D.C.V., D.G.A., D.L.C., D.L.O., D.M.G., D.M.S., D.S.P., D.V.R., E.A.N., E.C.B., E.E.C., E.G.G., E.H.O., E.P.G., E.P.V., E.T.T., F.G., F.G.U., G.A.Q., G.M.A., H.C.P., H.M.M., I.A., I.A.D., I.F.L., I.G., I.G.L., I.H.O., I.M.G., I.P.P., I.S.R., J.A.L., J.A.S., J.C.P., J.F.P., J.G.G., J.G.O., J.L.C., J.M.H., J.M.R., J.S.M., J.S.O., J.S.P., J.T., K.N.E., K.P.P., L.A.C., L.C.R., L.H.H., L.O.R., L.P.E., M.A.A., M.A.M., M.A.S., M.B.P., M.C.D., M.C.M., M.D.E., M.F.L., M.G.P., M.G.V., M.H., M.M.B., M.M.V., M.P.C., M.P.G., M.P.P., M.R.A., M.S.M., M.U.G., M.V.C., N.A.Q., N.C.A., N.E.M., N.M.L., N.M.M., N.P., P.A., M. R.A., R.C.C., R.D.P., R.F.L., R.G.R., R.P.F., S.G.H., S.L.V., S.M.C., S.T.T., S.V.C., T.A.M., V.A.R., V.L.O., V.O.V., V.V.P., W.P.R., Y.F.H., Y.J.T., Y.O.T., Y.U.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ahmad, Hassan)
September 22, 2019 Filing 9 ERRATA Corrected Header/Adding all remaining Plaintiffs by MMV, A.A.M., S.L.V., M.F.L., J.G.G., E.G.G., J.G.O., I.M.G., A.O.V., J.S.O., M.R.A., L.C.R., A.L.V., I.G.L., A.G.L., L.O.R., A.P.O., N.P., R.D.P., M.D.E., A.G.D., M.M.B., N.M.M., D.C.V., S.V.C., L.A.C., B.A.G., M.G.V., A.R.G., R.P.F., J.F.P., S.T.T., E.T.T., R.G.R., B.B.G., D.B.G., J.M.R., C.G.M., M. R.A., V.A.R., H.M.M., T.A.M., J.S.M., D.M.S., Y.U., F.G.U., I.F.L., R.F.L., R.C.C., D.L.C., N.M.L., A.R.M., M.C.D., E.E.C., Y.O.T., D.L.O., V.L.O., M.A.A., A.R.A., C.A.A., M.C.M., S.M.C., I.A.D., C.L.A., C.C.N., B.S.C., C.P.G., M.B.P., L.P.E., C.C.P., D.C.P., L.H.H., Y.F.H., A.A.T., C.A.T., V.O.V., E.H.O., I.H.O., W.P.R., J.C.P., H.C.P., D.M.G., N.E.M., A.B.C., E.C.B., P.A., I.A., G.A.Q., N.A.Q., A.A.Q., S.G.H., A.G.H., M.S.M., C.C.S., I.S.R., J.A.S., J.S.P., M.A.S., N.C.A., M.P.C., J.L.C., M.A.M., G.M.A., D.V.R., A.V.R., D.S.P., V.V.P., D.G.A., E.P.G., M.P.G., K.P.P., M.P.P., I.P.P., M.G.P., M.U.G., J.A.L., F.G., I.G., J.T., Y.J.T., M.V.C., E.P.V., K.N.E., E.A.N., M.H., J.M.H. #1 Complaint, filed by MMV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected captioning)(Ahmad, Hassan)
September 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amy Maldonado, :Firm- Law Office of Amy Maldonado, :Address- 333 Albert Ave #610, E. Lansing MI 48823. Phone No. - 517.803.2870. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6391625. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MMV (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Amy Maldonado, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahmad, Hassan)
September 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Bridget Cambria, :Firm- Cambria & Kline PC, :Address- 532 Walnut St Reading PA 19601. Phone No. - 484.926.2014. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6391618. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MMV (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bridget Cambria, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahmad, Hassan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY re #5 Response to Document (related case notice) filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, Andrew Davidson, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, MARK MORGAN. (Reuveni, Erez)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #3 Notice of Related Case, #4 Notice of Related Case IN OPPOSITION filed by MMV. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ahmad, Hassan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Defendants. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-2530. (Reuveni, Erez) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/25/2019) (zeg).
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Defendants. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-2117. (Reuveni, Erez) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/25/2019) (zeg).
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Erez Reuveni on behalf of All Defendants (Reuveni, Erez)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by A.A.M., A.A.Q., A.A.T., A.B.C., A.G.D., A.G.H., A.G.L., A.L.V., A.O.V., A.P.O., A.R.A., A.R.G., A.R.M., A.V.R., B.A.G., B.B.G., B.S.C., C.A.A., C.A.T., C.C.N., C.C.P., C.C.S., C.G.M., C.L.A., C.P.G., D.B.G., D.C.P., D.C.V., D.G.A., D.L.C., D.L.O., D.M.G., D.M.S., D.S.P., D.V.R., E.A.N., E.C.B., E.E.C., E.G.G., E.H.O., E.P.G., E.P.V., E.T.T., F.G., F.G.U., G.A.Q., G.M.A., H.C.P., H.M.M., I.A., I.A.D., I.F.L., I.G., I.G.L., I.H.O., I.M.G., I.P.P., I.S.R., J.A.L., J.A.S., J.C.P., J.F.P., J.G.G., J.G.O., J.L.C., J.M.H., J.M.R., J.S.M., J.S.O., J.S.P., J.T., K.N.E., K.P.P., L.A.C., L.C.R., L.H.H., L.O.R., L.P.E., M.A.A., M.A.M., M.A.S., M.B.P., M.C.D., M.C.M., M.D.E., M.F.L., M.G.P., M.G.V., M.H., M.M.B., M.M.V., M.P.C., M.P.G., M.P.P., M.R.A., M.S.M., M.U.G., M.V.C., N.A.Q., N.C.A., N.E.M., N.M.L., N.M.M., N.P., P.A., M. R.A., R.C.C., R.D.P., R.F.L., R.G.R., R.P.F., S.G.H., S.L.V., S.M.C., S.T.T., S.V.C., T.A.M., V.A.R., V.L.O., V.O.V., V.V.P., W.P.R., Y.F.H., Y.J.T., Y.O.T., Y.U. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zeg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6380624) filed by MMV. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Ahmad, Hassan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/23/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.M.V. et al v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner MARK MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MCHENRY
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK MORGAN
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MMV
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.P.E.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.O.V.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M.R.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.F.L.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.J.T.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.V.C.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.A.L.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.T.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.M.M.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.M.L.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.G.L.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.A.A.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.G.R.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.A.D.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.S.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.S.R.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.C.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: a minor E.P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.A.C.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.B.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.L.A.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.C.A.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.G.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.S.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.F.H.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.D.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.O.T.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: a minor S.V.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.V.R.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.G.H.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.P.V.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.P.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.A.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. R.A.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.C.R.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.A.T.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.L.C.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.V.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.P.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.A.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.T.T.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.G.V.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.H.O.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.M.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.C.C.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.T.T.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.A.M.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.B.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.U.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.S.C.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.A.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.V.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.M.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.U.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.F.L.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.P.C.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.A.Q.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.G.H.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.L.O.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.P.F.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.M.S.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.A.Q.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.H.H.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.V.C.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.A.Q.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.O.V.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.A.T.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.M.A.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.A.M.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.A.S.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.C.B.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.C.M.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M.H.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.C.N.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.P.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S.M.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.H.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.C.S.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.H.O.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.A.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.P.O.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.C.D.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.G.U.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.P.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.E.C.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.M.C.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.V.R.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D.E.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.G.A.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.P.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.A.A.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.C.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.A.N.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.B.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.B.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.G.D.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.C.V.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.E.M.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.G.L.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.M.M.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.F.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.A.R.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.M.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.S.M.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.P.R.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.L.V.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.L.C.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.S.O.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.A.S.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.L.O.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.B.C.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.A.M.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.R.A.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.G.M.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.N.E.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.G.O.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.P.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.G.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.F.L.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.C.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.G.P.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.L.V.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.O.R.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?