COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA et al v. DEVOS et al
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF VERMONT, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF OREGON, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA and STATE OF MICHIGAN
Defendant: ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION, INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER and SPEECH FIRST, INC.
Amicus Curiae: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, AASA, SCHOOL SUPERINTENDENT'S ASSOCIATION, STATE OF ARKANSAS, LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF KENTUCKY, AMERICAN COUNCIL ON EDUCATION, COUNCIL OF THE GREAT CITY SCHOOLS, CALIFORNIA WOMENS LAW CENTER, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, STATE OF ALASKA, STOP ABUSIVE AND VIOLENT ENVIRONMENT, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC., NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS, FAMILIES ADVOCATING FOR CAMPUS EQUALITY, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF ALABAMA, NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS, STATE OF LOUISIANA, NATIONAL CENTER FOR PARENT LEADERSHIP, ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT, NATIONAL ASSOCATION OF COUNCILS ON DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, EDUCATION LAW CENTER - PA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF FLORIDA, HIGHER EDUCATION ORGANIZATIONS and STATE OF TENNESSEE
Case Number: 1:2020cv01468
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 91 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF WISCONSIN, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA. (Thomson, Aimee) Modified event title on 7/30/2020 (znmw).
July 29, 2020 Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE before Judge Carl J. Nichols held on July 24, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-98. Date of Issuance: July 29, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Edwards. Telephone number (202) 354-3269. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or pur chased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2020.(Edwards, Lisa)
July 28, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Duggins-Clay on behalf of AASA, COUNCIL OF THE GREAT CITY SCHOOLS, SCHOOL SUPERINTENDENT'S ASSOCIATION (Duggins-Clay, Paige)
July 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum due by 7/29/2020. Government's Supplemental Memorandum due by 8/3/2020. (zcal)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. As discussed during the hearing held on this date, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs and the government shall submit supplemental memoranda, not to exceed 10 pages, addressing: (1) whether the Department of Education has the authority to make Plaintiffs' failure to comply with the Final Rule a violation of Title IX; and (2) whether Plaintiffs properly preserved this argument. Plaintiffs' supplemental memorandum is due on or before July 29, 2020, and the government's supplemental memorandum is due on or before August 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 24, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 24, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery A Simcox on behalf of STATE OF WISCONSIN (Simcox, Jeffery)
July 24, 2020 Minute Order and Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Preliminary Injunction held on 7/24/2020. #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; taken under advisement. Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards. (zcal)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Intervenor-Defendants #87 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian W. Barnes, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Brian W. Barnes is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 24, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 22, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian W. Barnes, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7373999. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian W. Barnes, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Brian)
July 22, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Justin Cooper on behalf of FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION (Cooper, Charles)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to Standing Order 20-20 (BAH), the Court will provide access for the public to participate in the hearing on Plaintiffs' #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Stay. It is ORDERED that the participants using the public access telephone line shall adhere to the rules set forth in the Standing Order, available on the Court's website.Toll Free Number: 877-873-8017; Access Code: 8692421. It is further ORDERED, that in the event the public line reaches its maximum capacity, the public may connect to the hearing utilizing the secondary access line. Toll Free Number: 877-873-8018; Access Code: 8256723. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 22, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 21, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Renee Brooks on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (Brooks, Angela) (Main Document 85 replaced on 7/22/2020) (zeg).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Intervenor-Defendants' #76 Motion for Leave to Take Depositions, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 21, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 20, 2020 Filing 84 RESPONSE re #76 MOTION to Take Deposition from Catherine Pope, Judith Ryan, Guillermo de Veyga, Connie Gardner, Angela Nastase, Sarah E. Harebo filed by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Riess, Daniel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 83 Memorandum in opposition to re #76 MOTION to Take Deposition from Catherine Pope, Judith Ryan, Guillermo de Veyga, Connie Gardner, Angela Nastase, Sarah E. Harebo filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WISCONSIN. (Fischer, Michael) Modified docket event/text on 7/21/2020 (eg).
July 17, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/24/2020 at 02:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcal)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs' #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Stay shall be held by videoconference on July 24, 2020, at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 17, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 17, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Bandy Dickey on behalf of ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Dickey, Jennifer)
July 17, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Baltes on behalf of INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, SPEECH FIRST, INC. (Baltes, Alexa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Fischer on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA (Fischer, Michael) (Main Document 80 replaced on 7/17/2020) (zeg).
July 16, 2020 Filing 79 AMICUS BRIEF by STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS. (Hacker, David)
July 16, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jonathan Hacker on behalf of STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS (Hacker, David)
July 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/20/2020. (zcal)
July 16, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Bangert on behalf of STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF NEBRASKA (Bangert, Ryan)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of Intervenor-Defendants' #76 Motion for Leave to Take Depositions, it is hereby ORDERED that the other Parties shall file a response on or before July 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 16, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #74 Amicus Brief, was entered in error per counsel request and will refile said pleading. (eg)
July 15, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION to Take Deposition from Catherine Pope, Judith Ryan, Guillermo de Veyga, Connie Gardner, Angela Nastase, Sarah E. Harebo by FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION, INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, SPEECH FIRST, INC. (Consovoy, William)
July 15, 2020 Filing 75 REPLY to opposition to motion re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA. (Thomson, Aimee)
July 15, 2020 Filing 74 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AMICUS BRIEF by STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS. (Hacker, David) Modified on 7/16/2020 (eg).
July 15, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Bangert on behalf of STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS (Bangert, Ryan)
July 15, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jonathan Hacker on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE (Hacker, David)
July 13, 2020 Filing 71 AMICUS BRIEF by STOP ABUSIVE AND VIOLENT ENVIRONMENT. (eg)
July 13, 2020 Filing 70 AMICUS BRIEF by FAMILIES ADVOCATING FOR CAMPUS EQUALITY. (eg)
July 13, 2020 Filing 69 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, EDUCATION LAW CENTER - PA, LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC., LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL ASSOCATION OF COUNCILS ON DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, NATIONAL CENTER FOR PARENT LEADERSHIP, ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT, NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS. (eg)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the #68 Consent Motion of Stop Abusive and Violent Environments for leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that the [68-1] Brief shall be deemed filed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 13, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the #66 Consent Motion of Families Advocating for Campus Equality for leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that the [66-1] Brief shall be deemed filed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 13, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Amici Curiae Civil Rights and Advocacy's #46 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey B. Kehlmann, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Geoffrey B. Kehlmann is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 13, 2020. (l ccjn3)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Amici Curiae Civil Rights and Advocacy's #45 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cynthia E. Tobisman, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Cynthia E. Tobisman is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 13, 2020. (lccj n3)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Amici Curiae Civil Rights and Advocacy's #44 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Hinojosa, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that David Hinojosa is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 13, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Intervenor-Defendants Independent Women's Law Center and Speech First, Inc.'s #43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexa R. Baltes, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Alexa R. Baltes is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Ni chols on July 13, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the #50 Consent Motion of Civil Rights and Advocacy for leave to file Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that the [50-1] Brief shall be deemed filed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 13, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Amici Curiae AASA, The Superintendents' Association, and the Council of the Great City Schools' #39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paige Duggins-Clay, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Paige Duggins-Clay is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 13, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiffs' #57 Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are permitted to file a Reply Brief that does not exceed 35 pages. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 13, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 9, 2020 Filing 68 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Stop Abusive and Violent Environment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Amicus Curiae, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Binnall, Jesse)
July 9, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse R. Binnall on behalf of Stop Abusive and Violent Environment (Binnall, Jesse) (Main Document 67 replaced on 7/13/2020) (zeg).
July 9, 2020 Filing 66 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by FAMILIES ADVOCATING FOR CAMPUS EQUALITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, #2 Appendix, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dillon, Justin)
July 9, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Aleksandra O. Rushing on behalf of COUNCIL OF THE GREAT CITY SCHOOLS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS, SCHOOL SUPERINTENDENT'S ASSOCIATION (Rushing, Aleksandra)
July 8, 2020 Filing 64 Memorandum in opposition to re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay filed by FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION, INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, SPEECH FIRST, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Consovoy, William)
July 8, 2020 Filing 63 Memorandum in opposition to re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay filed by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Riess, Daniel)
July 8, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Riehl on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Riehl, Christina)
July 8, 2020 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT re #39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paige Duggins-Clay, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7286688. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS. (Neeley, Steven)
July 7, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Poyer on behalf of CALIFORNIA WOMENS LAW CENTER (Poyer, Amy)
July 7, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Esra A. Hudson on behalf of CALIFORNIA WOMENS LAW CENTER (Hudson, Esra)
July 7, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna Sobol McCallum on behalf of CALIFORNIA WOMENS LAW CENTER (McCallum, Joanna)
July 7, 2020 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomson, Aimee)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendants #54 Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants are permitted to file an Opposition Brief that does not exceed 50 pages. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 7, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 7, 2020 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riess, Daniel)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Movant-Intervenors' #27 Motion to Intervene, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Although it is a close question whether any Movant has demonstrated that it is entitled to intervene as of right under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a) (Movant-Intervenor FIRE having presented the closest question), the Movants are permitted to intervene under Rule 24(b). "[P]ermissive intervention is an inherently discretionary enterprise," and district courts are afforded "wide latitude" in exercising their discretion. E.E.O.C. v. Nat'l Children's Ctr., Inc., 146 F.3d 1042, 1046 (D.C. Cir. 1998). The Motion to Intervene was timely, and because Movants will follow the deadlines that govern Defendants, their intervention will not unduly delay or prejudice Plaintiffs' rights. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 6, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 6, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan B Smith on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA (Smith, Ryan)
July 3, 2020 Filing 56 AMICUS BRIEF by AASA, COUNCIL OF THE GREAT CITY SCHOOLS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS, SCHOOL SUPERINTENDENT'S ASSOCIATION. (eg)
July 3, 2020 Filing 55 AMICUS BRIEF by CALIFORNIA WOMENS LAW CENTER. (eg)
July 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Motions due by 7/7/2020. Defendant Motions due by 7/9/2020. (zcal)
July 3, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY to opposition to motion re #27 MOTION to Intervene filed by FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION, INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, SPEECH FIRST, INC.. (Consovoy, William)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Amici Curiae AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, the Council of the Great City Schools, and the National Association of Secondary School Principals' #40 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Allen F. James, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Allen F. James is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 3, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Amici Curiae AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, the Council of the Great City Schools, and the National Association of Secondary School Principals' #38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aleksandra O. Rushing, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Aleksandra O. Rushing is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 3, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Amici Curiae AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, the Council of the Great City Schools, and the National Association of Secondary School Principals' #37 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott Schneider, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Scott Schneider is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 3, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the #35 Consent Motion of AASA, The School Superintendents Association, the Council of the Great City Schools, and the National Association of Secondary School Principals for leave to file Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that the [35-1] Brief shall be deemed filed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 3, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the #34 Consent Motion of California Women's Law Center for leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that the [34-1] Brief shall be deemed filed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 3, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Amicus Curiae California Womens Law Center's #33 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Esra A. Hudson, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Esra A. Hudson is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 3, 2020. (lcdf)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Amicus Curiae California Womens Law Center's #32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joanna McCallum, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Joanna McCallum is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 3, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Amicus Curiae California Womens Law Center's #31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy Poyer, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Amy Poyer is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 3, 2020. (lccjn3)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that motions seeking leave to file amicus or amici briefs in support of Plaintiffs' #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Stay must be submitted on or before July 7, 2020, and motions seeking leave to file amicus or amici briefs in support of Defendants' Opposition must be submitted on or before July 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 3, 2020. (lccjn3) Modified on 7/6/2020 (lccjn3).
July 2, 2020 Filing 51 ERRATA by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WISCONSIN #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF WISCONSIN, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Soueid, Marie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 50 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, EDUCATION LAW CENTER - PA, LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC., LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL ASSOCATION OF COUNCILS ON DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, NATIONAL CENTER FOR PARENT LEADERSHIP, ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT, NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Greenbaum, Jon)
July 1, 2020 Filing 49 Memorandum in opposition to re #27 MOTION to Intervene filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WISCONSIN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soueid, Marie)
July 1, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE re #27 MOTION to Intervene filed by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Riess, Daniel)
June 30, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Geoffrey B. Kehlmann, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7287348. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, EDUCATION LAW CENTER - PA, LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC., LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL ASSOCATION OF COUNCILS ON DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, NATIONAL CENTER FOR PARENT LEADERSHIP, ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT, NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Greenbaum, Jon)
June 30, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cynthia E. Tobisman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7287338. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, EDUCATION LAW CENTER - PA, LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC., LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL ASSOCATION OF COUNCILS ON DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, NATIONAL CENTER FOR PARENT LEADERSHIP, ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT, NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Greenbaum, Jon)
June 30, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David Hinojosa, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7287333. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, EDUCATION LAW CENTER - PA, LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC., LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL ASSOCATION OF COUNCILS ON DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, NATIONAL CENTER FOR PARENT LEADERSHIP, ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT, NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Greenbaum, Jon)
June 30, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alexa R. Baltes, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7287287. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, SPEECH FIRST, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Baltes, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Norris, Cameron)
June 30, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Greenbaum on behalf of AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, EDUCATION LAW CENTER - PA, LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC., LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL ASSOCATION OF COUNCILS ON DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, NATIONAL CENTER FOR PARENT LEADERSHIP, ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT, NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS (Greenbaum, Jon)
June 30, 2020 Filing 41 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, EDUCATION LAW CENTER - PA, LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC., NATIONAL CENTER FOR PARENT LEADERSHIP, ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT, NATIONAL ASSOCATION OF COUNCILS ON DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief)(Greenbaum, Jon)
June 30, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Allen Ford James, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7286699. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, Council of the Great City Schools, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Allen Ford James in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Neeley, Steven)
June 30, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paige Duggins-Clay, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7286688. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, Council of the Great City Schools, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paige Duggins-Clay in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Neeley, Steven)
June 30, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Aleksandra Rushing, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7286674. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, Council of the Great City Schools, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Aleksandra Rushing in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Neeley, Steven)
June 30, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Scott Schneider, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7286667. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, Council of the Great City Schools, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Scott Schneider in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Neeley, Steven)
June 30, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisol Leon on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Leon, Marisol)
June 30, 2020 Filing 35 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by AASA, The School Superintendents' Association, Council of the Great City Schools, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Neeley, Steven)
June 30, 2020 Filing 34 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by CALIFORNIA WOMENS LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Amicus Curiae Brief of California Women's Law Center, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schur, David)
June 30, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Esra A. Hudson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7286128. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CALIFORNIA WOMENS LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schur, David)
June 30, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joanna McCallum, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7286098. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CALIFORNIA WOMENS LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schur, David)
June 30, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amy Poyer, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7286048. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CALIFORNIA WOMENS LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schur, David)
June 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 7/8/2020. Reply due by 7/15/2020. (zcal)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' #29 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that: on or before July 8, 2020, Defendants shall file their Opposition to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Stay; and on or before July 15, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file their Reply in Support of their Motion. The Court may, if necessary, schedule a hearing on the Motion at a later date. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 30, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 30, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Thomas Norris on behalf of INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, SPEECH FIRST, INC. (Norris, Cameron)
June 29, 2020 Filing 29 Joint STATUS REPORT (Soueid, Marie) Modified docket text/event on 7/1/2020 (eg).
June 27, 2020 Filing 47 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN COUNCIL ON EDUCATION, HIGHER EDUCATION ORGANIZATIONS. (eg)
June 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 7/1/2020. Reply due by 7/3/2020. (zcal)
June 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Movant-Intervenors' #28 Motion to Expedite Briefing and Decision on Motion to Intervene, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that: on or before July 1, 2020, the Parties shall file their Responses to the #27 Motion to Intervene, and on or before July 3, 2020, Movant-Intervenors shall file their Reply. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 27, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the #26 Consent Motion of the American Council on Education and 24 Other Higher Education Organizations for leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that the [26-1] Brief shall be deemed filed. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 27, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 26, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Expedite by FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION, INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, SPEECH FIRST, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
June 25, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Intervene by FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION, SPEECH FIRST, INC., INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
June 24, 2020 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by AMERICAN COUNCIL ON EDUCATION (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Susan)
June 24, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Riess on behalf of All Defendants (Riess, Daniel)
June 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2020. (zcal)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of Plaintiffs' 22 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction or 5 U.S.C. 705 Stay Pending Judicial Review, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before June 29, 2020, the Parties shall meet, confer, and file a Joint Status Report that includes: (1) a proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion and (2) a statement addressing whether a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion is necessary, and if so, a date for such a hearing. The Parties may also address any other issues that they believe will be helpful to the Court. Any disagreements should be noted in the Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 24, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa L. Kassab on behalf of STATE OF DELAWARE (Kassab, Vanessa) (Main Document 24 replaced on 6/26/2020) (zeg). (Main Document 24 replaced on 6/26/2020) (zeg).
June 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Douglas Wright on behalf of STATE OF DELAWARE (Wright, Christian)
June 23, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WISCONSIN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of law, #3 Appendix Appendix)(Soueid, Marie). Added MOTION to Stay on 6/25/2020 (znmw).
June 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Shubhra Shivpuri on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Shivpuri, Shubhra)
June 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Rheiner on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Rheiner, Daniel) (Main Document 20 replaced on 6/26/2020) (zeg).
June 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Patrick Hizon Warwick-Diaz on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Warwick-Diaz, J. Patrick) (Main Document 19 replaced on 6/26/2020) (zeg).
June 23, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Skippere S. Spear on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Spear, Skippere) (Main Document 18 replaced on 6/26/2020) (zeg).
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelynn Nichole Rich Fredericks on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Rich Fredericks, Jacquelynn) (Main Document 17 replaced on 6/26/2020) (zeg).
June 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Woodruff on behalf of STATE OF MINNESOTA (Woodruff, Kathryn) (Main Document 16 replaced on 6/26/2020) (zeg).
June 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Finnerty on behalf of STATE OF MINNESOTA (Finnerty, Kevin) (Main Document 15 replaced on 6/26/2020) (zeg). (Main Document 15 replaced on 6/26/2020) (zeg).
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Estelle Bronstein on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY (Bronstein, Estelle)
June 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Kane Wanger on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY (Wanger, Emily)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA . (Thomson, Aimee)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Panchalam Seshan Srividya on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Srividya, Panchalam)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Hsiao-Ting Chuang on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Chuang, Christine)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Lynne Faer on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Faer, Laura)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Merry Samuels on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA (Samuels, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Boyer on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA (Boyer, Jacob)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison V Hill on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Hill, Alison)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Beneski on behalf of STATE OF WASHINGTON (Beneski, Kristin)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 8, 2020. (lccjn3)
June 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie Soueid on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY (Soueid, Marie) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/8/2020) (zeg).
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
June 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Thomson, Aimee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA et al v. DEVOS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By: J. Patrick Hizon Warwick-Diaz
Represented By: Skippere S. Spear
Represented By: Jacquelynn Nichole Rich Fredericks
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Represented By: Daniel Rheiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: Kevin Finnerty
Represented By: Kathryn Woodruff
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Alison V Hill
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Aimee D. Thomson
Represented By: Michael John Fischer
Represented By: Jacob Boyer
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Represented By: Ryan B Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Angela Renee Brooks
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WISCONSIN
Represented By: Jeffery A Simcox
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Christian Douglas Wright
Represented By: Vanessa L. Kassab
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: Emily Kane Wanger
Represented By: Estelle Bronstein
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Jessica Merry Samuels
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Panchalam Seshan Srividya
Represented By: Shubhra Shivpuri
Represented By: Marisol Leon
Represented By: Christine Hsiao-Ting Chuang
Represented By: Christina Riehl
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Represented By: Laura Lynne Faer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Marie Soueid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELISABETH DEVOS
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Represented By: Jennifer Bandy Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Represented By: Jennifer Bandy Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Represented By: Jennifer Bandy Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AASA
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SCHOOL SUPERINTENDENT'S ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Aleksandra O. Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF KENTUCKY
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COUNCIL ON EDUCATION
Represented By: Susan Margaret Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COUNCIL OF THE GREAT CITY SCHOOLS
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Aleksandra O. Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA WOMENS LAW CENTER
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Represented By: David T. Schur
Represented By: Joanna Sobol McCallum
Represented By: Esra A. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ALASKA
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STOP ABUSIVE AND VIOLENT ENVIRONMENT
Represented By: Jesse R. Binnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC.
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Represented By: Aleksandra O. Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FAMILIES ADVOCATING FOR CAMPUS EQUALITY
Represented By: Justin Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CENTER FOR PARENT LEADERSHIP, ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCATION OF COUNCILS ON DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EDUCATION LAW CENTER - PA
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEBRASKA
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HIGHER EDUCATION ORGANIZATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF TENNESSEE
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Ryan Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Represented By: Alexa Baltes
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SPEECH FIRST, INC.
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Represented By: Alexa Baltes
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?