Humphrey et al v. Cain et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael L. Humphrey |
Defendant: |
Cheatam, Cain, Mills, Mendoza and Alston |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00117 |
Filed: |
July 18, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Augusta Office |
County: |
Columbia |
Presiding Judge: |
Brian K. Epps |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Randal Hall |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 8, 2017 |
Filing
54
ORDER ADOPTING 49 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge. 48 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Cheatam, and 30 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Cheatam are GRANTED. Defendant Cheatam is dismissed from this case and this civil action is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/08/2017. (pts)
|
July 19, 2017 |
Filing
53
ORDER making the mandate of the USCA, the Order of this Court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/19/17. (cmr)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing
44
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DISMISSING without prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Mills for failure to timely effect service, and DISMISSING Defendant Mills from this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 06/19/2017. (maa)
|
November 28, 2016 |
Filing
4
ORDER directing Plaintiff to explain the reason(s) for the delay in service of process and why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to timely effect service within fourteen days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/28/2016. (maa)
|
August 25, 2016 |
Filing
3
ORDER that, because Plaintiff has paid the $400.00 filing fee and is proceeding pro se, the Court will provide him with basic instructions regarding the development and progression of this case; instructing Plaintiff that he is responsible for s erving the Defendants with a copy of the complaint and the notice of lawsuit and request for waver of service of summons and the waiver of service of summons forms; directing the Clerk to attach the appropriate number of forms to Plaintiff's ser vice copy of this Order; informing Plaintiff that he has ninety (90) days from the date of this Order to serve Defendants, and failure to do so may result in their dismissal from this lawsuit or dismissal of this case, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/25/2016. (jah)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?