Castillo v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: William Navarro Castillo
Defendant: Johnson, Chavez, King, Cox, Robinson, Faster, Strickland, Benit, Smith, Brantley, Paul, Kilgore and MeCray
Case Number: 6:2016cv00049
Filed: April 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying 94 Motion to Demand a Speedy Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/18/2020. (ca)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER ADOPTING the 70 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the Court's opinion and overrules Plaintiff's 71 Objections; denying Plaintiff's 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/13/2019. (jlh)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DENY Plaintiff's 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 9/9/2019). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/26/2019. (csr)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER adopting 59 Report and Recommendations granting Defendant Strickland's 10 Motion to Dismiss and dismisses Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Strickland without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 01/23/2018. (jlh)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court GRANT Defendant's 10 MOTION to Dismiss, DISMISS without prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Strickland based on his failure to exhaust his administrative remedie s, and DENY Plaintiff in forma pauperis status on appeal. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 12/5/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/21/2017. (ca)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Directing the United States Marshals Service to attempt personal service on Mr. Brantley of the 1 Complaint and 8 Order of 8/8/16. Plaintiff shall notify the Court of Mr. Brantley's present and/or last known address by the close of business on 8/21/2017. Plaintiff must perfect service on Defendant Brantley by 9/15/17. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/10/2017. (Attachments: # 1 USM-285) (pts)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER directing that a copy of Plaintiff's complaint and a copy of the Court's Order dated August 8, 2016 shall be served upon Mr. Brantley at his last known address by the United States Marshal Service without prepayment of cost. Should Pl aintiff fail to perfect service on Defendant Brantley by April 6, 2017, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, as to why the Court should not dismiss his claims against Defendant Brantley without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file this show cause memorandum by no later than April 20, 2017. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/13/2017. (maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2017: # 1 USM 285) (maa).
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Permission to file under seal. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 01/09/2017. (maa)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DIRECTING the parties to abide by the instructions contained in this Order. The Court ORDERS David Grossman, who has filed the Motion to Dismiss on Defendant Strickland's behalf, to make reasonable efforts to obtain a name and an address for "Defendant Brantley" so that he may be served with Plaintiff's Complaint within thirty (30) days of this Order and to notify the Court of the results of his efforts. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/19/2016. (csr)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Defendant's 15 Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all proceedings, including discovery, are stayed pending a ruling by the Court on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, at which time a discovery schedule will be entered as to any claims that may remain. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/15/2016. (csr)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting 7 Report and Recommendations, DISMISSING Plaintiff's monetary damages claims against Defendants in their official capacities and DISMISSING Plaintiff's claims against Defendants King, Smith, Johnson, Chavez, Cox, Benit, McCray, Paul, Kilgore, Foster, and Robinson. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/25/2016. (maa)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to file any response in opposition to the Defendant Strickland's 10 MOTION for a Dismissal or to inform the court of his decision not to oppose Defendant Strickland's Motion within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is instructed to attach a copy of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41 and 12 to the copy of this Order that is served on the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 10/20/2016. (csr)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the United States Marshal Service to serve Defendants Brantley and Strickland with a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint and a copy of this Order. Generally, a defendant who timely returns the waiver is not required to answer the complaint until sixty days after the date that the marshal sent the request for waiver. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/8/2016. (csr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Navarro Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MeCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?