Veenstra, et al. v. Little, et al.
Plaintiff: Albert Pete Veenstra, III, Kent Ellis, Charles Lynn Sacolick, Allen Brandt, Tony Garren, Hunter Smith, Weston Allen, Ruben Garzia, Shane Striker, William Canite, Joshae Patterson, Erineo Garza, Jose Cuevas, Hans Kruger, James Elkins, Frank Alesi, Matthew Smith, Steve Brown, Jason Homburg, Mario Garcia, Christopher Pielstick, Clarence Meeks, Alex Watanabe, David Hoots, Ryan Hale, Kim Firouzbakhah, Nathak Knutson, Acencion Hernandez, Christopher Ostergar, Daniel Perkins, Dennis Reed, Tyrell McKnight, And all those similarly situated under the care, custody and control of the IDOC or the Idaho Department of Probation and Parole, William Conite and Tyrell McKinght
Defendant: Brad Little, Idaho State Board of Correction Members, Director IDOC Josh Tewalt, Alberto Ramirez, Idaho Dept. of Probation and Parole, Commission of Pardon and Parole and State of Idaho
Case Number: 1:2021cv00341
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 27 USCA Scheduling Order 21-35927 as to #23 Notice of Appeal filed by Albert Pete Veenstra, III. (Notice sent by e-mail to Court Reporter) (kt)
November 5, 2021 Filing 26 USCA Case Number 21-35927 for #23 Notice of Appeal filed by Albert Pete Veenstra, III. (kt)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER OF PLAINTIFF VEENSTRAS CLAIMS - Plaintiff Veenstras claims are DISMISSED as moot, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and 1915A, and Plaintiff Veenstra is TERMINATED as a party to this action. See Washington, 833 F.3d at 1056 (affirmative defense clear from the face of the complaint is appropriate basis for dismissal under 1915 and 1915A). Accordingly, Plaintiff Veenstras Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #8 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
November 1, 2021 Filing 24 RETURN MAIL attempted to mail the Order Dismissing Unexhausted Claim to RYAN HALE at the address provided. This person is no longer at that address. Unable to find a forwarding address. (lm)
November 1, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEAL 21-35927 as to Dkt #18 Order Denying Motion to Rescind General Order 342 filed by Albert Pete Veenstra, III. Filing Fee Due. (Notice sent to Court Reporter & 9th Cir) (lm) Modified on 11/5/2021 to add USCA case number(kt).
October 28, 2021 Filing 22 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #21 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Filed by Hans Kruger. (lm)
October 28, 2021 Filing 21 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Hans Kruger. Responses due by 11/18/2021 (lm)
October 22, 2021 Filing 20 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #19 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kent Ellis. (kt)
October 22, 2021 Filing 19 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kent Ellis. Responses due by 11/12/2021 (kt)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RESCIND GENERAL ORDER 342 - ACCORDINGLY, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Veenstras Motion to Rescind General Order 342 (Dkt. #3 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING UNEXHAUSTED CLAIMS - Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Brief in Support of Class Certification (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED. The Court has considered this brief. All claims of Plaintiffs Brandt, Garren, H. Smith, Allen, Garzia, Striker, Conite, Patterson, Garza, Cuevas, Kruger, Elkins, Alesi, M. Smith, Brown, Homburg, Garcia, Pielstick, Meeks, Watanabe, Hoots, Hale, Firouzbakhah, Knutson, Hernandez, Ostergar, Perkins, Reed, and McKnight are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. These 29 Plaintiffs are TERMINATED as parties to this action. Under the PLRA, the Complaint remains subject to review by the Court, and a screening order may issue at a later date. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
October 19, 2021 Filing 16 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. by Frank Alesi. (lm)
October 13, 2021 Filing 15 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #14 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Pielstick. (Attachments: #1 Offender Account Activity, #2 Order of Conditional Filing (Received w/ docs))(kt)
October 13, 2021 Filing 14 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christopher Pielstick. Responses due by 11/3/2021 (kt)
October 12, 2021 Filing 13 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #12 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tyrell McKinght. (kt)
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tyrell McKinght. Responses due by 11/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #10 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Perkins. (kt)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Daniel Perkins. Responses due by 10/26/2021 (kt)
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #4 Order of Conditional Filing filed by Alan Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(kt) Modified on 10/6/2021 (lm).
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Albert Pete Veenstra, III. Responses due by 10/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Account History)(kt)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST by Plaintiff Albert Pete Veenstra, III for copy of docker sheet.(kt)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Albert Pete Veenstra, III (Address on record updated) (kt)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Albert Pete Veenstra re: #4 Order of Conditional Filing. (kt)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (lm)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Rescind General Order No. 342 by Plaintiff Albert Pete Veenstra, III. Responses due by 10/6/2021. (jd)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support by Plaintiffs Kent Ellis, Charles Lynn Sacolick and Albert Pete Veenstra, III. Responses due by 10/6/2021. (jd)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Motion for Leave, #3 Motion to Rescind, #4 Exhibit, #5 Envelope)(lm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veenstra, et al. v. Little, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Pete Veenstra, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lynn Sacolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Garren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weston Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Garzia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Striker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Canite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshae Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erineo Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Cuevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Alesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Homburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Pielstick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Watanabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hoots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Firouzbakhah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathak Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acencion Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ostergar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrell McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: And all those similarly situated under the care, custody and control of the IDOC or the Idaho Department of Probation and Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Conite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrell McKinght
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho State Board of Correction Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director IDOC Josh Tewalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Dept. of Probation and Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commission of Pardon and Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?