Scroggin v. Galipeau
Plaintiff: Brandon Lee Scroggin
Defendant: Angenea Williams, Jessica Alvarez Statham, Motsenhagen, Stephen Garcia, John Harvil, Sexual Assualt Response Team, James Henrich, Deu, Jones, Borm, Connie Byers, Daniel Diaz, Livers, Anthony Parham, Q Livers, Kenneth Watts, Gary Lewis, Charles Herr, Freyek, Galipeau, C McKinney, Farley, Creasy, Jessica Rain, Coronet, Crittendon, Timmons, Rebeck, Lester Jones, Kenneth Reed, Armstrong, Hicks, Quinten Davis, Jones, Jr and (Tight Pants)
Not Classified By Court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00441
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Brandon Lee Scroggin. Clerk is DIRECTED to put this case number on a blank Prisoner Complaint Form (INND Rev. 2/20) and send it to Mr. Scroggin; GRANTING him until 8/21/2020 to file an amended complaint if he so wishes; Mr. Scroggin is CAUTIONED, that, if he does not respond by that deadline, his case will be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915A because the amended complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(mrm)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING #19 Motion to "Unpublish/Remove the Courts Opinion/Order from 7/8/2020" and also DENYING #18 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 7/21/2020. (mrm)
July 20, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Brandon Lee Scroggin. (nae)
July 20, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to "File Under Seal" by Plaintiff Brandon Lee Scroggin. (nae)
July 20, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jessica Alvarez Statham, Coronet(Ms., Director of G.S.C. Complex also prior D.I.I. "Internal Investigations", sued in individual and offical capacity), Galipeau, C McKinney, Motsenhagen, Kenneth Watts, filed by Brandon Lee Scroggin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(nae)
July 15, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Unpublish/Remove the Courts Opinion/Order from 7/8/2020, and to Keep Future Filings, Opinions, Orders, Confidential or Private from Public Access re: #10 Opinion and Order by Plaintiff Brandon Lee Scroggin. (nae)
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike DE #13 Motion Seeking This Courts Guidance on Prisoner Complaint Filed on 6-3-2020 by Plaintiff Brandon Lee Scroggin. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk)(nae)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #14 Motion to Preserve Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/10/20. (mlc)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #12 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/10/20. (mlc)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #13 Motion Seeking This Courts Guidance. Mr. Scroggin must follow the court's directives in its July 8, 2020 order regarding the filing of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 7/10/20. (nal)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/8/20. (ksp)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Brandon Lee Scroggin; GRANTING him until 8/7/2020 to file an amended complaint that includes only related claims arising out of the same occurrence or series of occurrences; and CAUTIONING him that if he fails to respond by this deadline, or if the amended complaint persists in unrelated claims, the court will pick which claim(s) he's allowed to proceed with in this case and dismiss the rest of them. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 7/8/2020. (lhc)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING Brandon Lee Scroggin, IDOC #160117 to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; and DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 7/8/2020. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(mrm)
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION To Preserve Evidence, filed by Plaintiff Brandon Lee Scroggin. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(ksp)
July 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION Seeking This Courts Guidance on Prisoner Complaint File Already on 6-3-2020, filed by Plaintiff Brandon Lee Scroggin. (ksp)
July 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel/Order the Westville Correctional Facility to Produce the Following Evidence "Namely" (Documents), filed by Plaintiff Brandon Lee Scroggin. (ksp)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 ATTACHMENT to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Brandon Lee Scroggin. (nae)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Brandon Scroggin requesting status (nae)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Brandon Scroggin requesting copy of complaint be sent by mail. (Copy sent) (nae)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Brandon Lee Scroggin. (nae)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Brandon Lee Scroggin. (nae)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Brandon Lee Scroggin. (nae)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jessica Alvarez Statham, Armstrong, Borm, Connie Byers, Coronet(Ms., Director of G.S.C. Complex also prior D.I.I. "Internal Investigations", sued in individual and offical capacity), Coronet(Mr., Major of Westville, sued in individual and offical capacity), Creasy, Crittendon, Deu, Daniel Diaz, Farley, Freyek, Galipeau, Stephen Garcia, John Harvil, James Henrich, Charles Herr, Hicks, Jones, Lester Jones, Gary Lewis, Livers, Q Livers, C McKinney, Motsenhagen, Anthony Parham, Jessica Rain, Rebeck, Kenneth Reed, Sexual Assualt Response Team, Timmons, Kenneth Watts, Angenea Williams, filed by Brandon Lee Scroggin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(nae) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct typo (nae).
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Brandon Lee Scroggin. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scroggin v. Galipeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angenea Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Alvarez Statham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motsenhagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harvil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sexual Assualt Response Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Henrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q Livers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freyek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galipeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Rain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coronet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinten Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (Tight Pants)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Lee Scroggin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?