Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. et al v. Coit et al
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF ZOOLOGICAL PARKS AND AQUARIUMS INC. doing business as Association of Zoos and Aquariums, Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf and Surfrider Foundation
Defendant: Janet Coit, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, Gina Raimondo, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Amanda Lefton and Deb Haaland
Petitioner: American Petroleum Institute and International Association of Geophysical Contractors
Case Number: 8:2021cv01827
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Referring Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1531
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #34 MOTION to Intervene filed by American Association of Zoological Parks and Aquariums Inc., Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Surfrider Foundation.(Wall, Michael)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 9/13/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2021 Filing 44 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ryan P Steen. Directing attorney Ryan P Steen to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 9/7/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2021 Filing 43 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ariel Stavitsky. Directing attorney Ariel Stavitsky to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/7/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2021 Filing 42 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jason T Morgan. Directing attorney Jason T Morgan to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 9/7/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan P. Steen (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9476226.) by American Petroleum Institute, International Association of Geophysical Contractors(Brunette, Nathan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ariel Stavitsky (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9476224.) by American Petroleum Institute, International Association of Geophysical Contractors(Brunette, Nathan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jason T. Morgan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9476211.) by American Petroleum Institute, International Association of Geophysical Contractors(Brunette, Nathan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 38 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by International Association of Geophysical Contractors (Brunette, Nathan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 37 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American Petroleum Institute (Brunette, Nathan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT re #34 MOTION to Intervene by Dustin Van Liew for/ by American Petroleum Institute, International Association of Geophysical Contractors(Brunette, Nathan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT re #34 MOTION to Intervene by Kevin O'Scannlain for/ by American Petroleum Institute, International Association of Geophysical Contractors(Brunette, Nathan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Intervene by American Petroleum Institute, International Association of Geophysical Contractors (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Proposed Answer of Defendant-Intervenors API and IAGC, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Brunette, Nathan)
August 26, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Judge Paula Xinis no longer assigned to the case. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2021 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Surfrider Foundation, American Association of Zoological Parks and Aquariums Inc., Center for Biological Diversity, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Healthy Gulf. Bureau of Ocean Energy Management served on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021; Janet Coit served on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021; Deb Haaland served on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021; Amanda Lefton served on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021; National Marine Fisheries Service served on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021; National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration served on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021; Gina Raimondo served on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Eaton, Christopher)
July 27, 2021 Filing 32 Summons Issued 60 days as to Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Center for Biological Diversity, Janet Coit, Deb Haaland, Amanda Lefton, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, Gina Raimondo, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2021 Filing 31 Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by American Association of Zoological Parks and Aquariums Inc., Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Surfrider Foundation Request for Summons (USAO MD) (DeMarco, Peter)
July 26, 2021 Filing 30 Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by American Association of Zoological Parks and Aquariums Inc., Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Surfrider Foundation Request for Summons (U.S. AG) (DeMarco, Peter)
July 26, 2021 Filing 29 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Surfrider Foundation, American Association of Zoological Parks and Aquariums Inc., Healthy Gulf, Center for Biological Diversity, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Summons were provided for only the named Defendant. If the defendant is either an agency of the United States or an officer or employee of the United States, you must serve both the U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland, as well as each defendant. Please electronically submit a summons for U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland using the Civil event "Supplemental" located under "Other Filings", and then "Other Documents". (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2021 Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael E Wall. Directing attorney Michael E Wall to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2021 Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gabriel J Daly. Directing attorney Gabriel J Daly to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2021 Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Adeline Rolnick. Directing attorney Adeline Rolnick to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2021 Filing 25 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF ZOOLOGICAL PARKS AND AQUARIUMS INC. (DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael E. Wall (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9395674.) by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.(DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gabriel J. Daly (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9395672.) by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.(DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adeline Rolnick (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9395666.) by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.(DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen Daniel Mashuda. Attorney Stephen Daniel Mashuda will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2021 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brettny Hardy. Attorney Brettny Hardy will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2021 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Cari Miyoko Sakashita. Directing attorney Cari Miyoko Sakashita to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2021 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristen Monsell. Directing attorney Kristen Monsell to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen D. Mashuda (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9395070.) by Healthy Gulf, Surfrider Foundation(Eaton, Christopher)
July 22, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brettny Hardy (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9395041.) by Healthy Gulf, Surfrider Foundation(Eaton, Christopher)
July 22, 2021 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Surfrider Foundation (Eaton, Christopher)
July 22, 2021 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Healthy Gulf (Eaton, Christopher)
July 22, 2021 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity (Gowen, Christopher)
July 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cari Miyoko Sakashita (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9394963.) by Center for Biological Diversity(Gowen, Christopher)
July 22, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kristen Monsell (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9394952.) by Center for Biological Diversity(Gowen, Christopher)
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. (DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF ZOOLOGICAL PARKS AND AQUARIUMS INC., Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Surfrider Foundation re #1 Complaint, Request for Summons (Raimondo) (DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF ZOOLOGICAL PARKS AND AQUARIUMS INC., Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Surfrider Foundation re #1 Complaint, Request for Summons (NOAA) (DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF ZOOLOGICAL PARKS AND AQUARIUMS INC., Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Surfrider Foundation re #1 Complaint, Request for Summons (NMFS) (DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF ZOOLOGICAL PARKS AND AQUARIUMS INC., Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Surfrider Foundation re #1 Complaint, Request for Summons (Lefton) (DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF ZOOLOGICAL PARKS AND AQUARIUMS INC., Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Surfrider Foundation re #1 Complaint, Request for Summons (Haaland) (DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF ZOOLOGICAL PARKS AND AQUARIUMS INC., Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Surfrider Foundation re #1 Complaint, Request for Summons (BOEM) (DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF ZOOLOGICAL PARKS AND AQUARIUMS INC., Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Surfrider Foundation re #1 Complaint, Request for Summons (Coit) (DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF ZOOLOGICAL PARKS AND AQUARIUMS INC., Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Surfrider Foundation re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9394450.), filed by Surfrider Foundation, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF ZOOLOGICAL PARKS AND AQUARIUMS INC., Center for Biological Diversity, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Healthy Gulf.(DeMarco, Peter)
July 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Paula Xinis. (ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. et al v. Coit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Peter James DeMarco
Represented By: Adeline Rolnick
Represented By: Gabriel J Daly
Represented By: Michael E Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF ZOOLOGICAL PARKS AND AQUARIUMS INC. doing business as Association of Zoos and Aquariums
Represented By: Peter James DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Cari Miyoko Sakashita
Represented By: Christopher James Gowen
Represented By: Kristen Monsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthy Gulf
Represented By: Christopher D. Eaton
Represented By: Brettny Hardy
Represented By: Stephen Daniel Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surfrider Foundation
Represented By: Christopher D. Eaton
Represented By: Brettny Hardy
Represented By: Stephen Daniel Mashuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Coit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Raimondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Lefton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: Ariel Stavitsky
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Represented By: Nathan Charles Brunette
Represented By: Ryan P Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: International Association of Geophysical Contractors
Represented By: Ariel Stavitsky
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Represented By: Nathan Charles Brunette
Represented By: Ryan P Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?