Connerton et al v. Menu Foods Midwest Corporation et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Kimberly Mello and Megan Connerton
Defendant: The Iams Company, Target Corporation, Xuzhou Anying Biologic Technology Development Company Ltd., Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., ChemNutra Inc. and Nutro Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv10797
Filed: April 25, 2007
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Douglas P. Woodlock
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2008 Case transferred via case extraction to the District of New Jersey pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 7/16/07. New Jersey case number 08cv00879. (Jones, Sherry)
December 26, 2007 21 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Gabrielle R. Wolohojian (Wolohojian, Gabrielle)
December 19, 2007 20 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Gabrielle R. Wolohojian (Wolohojian, Gabrielle)
December 18, 2007 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Butts on behalf of The Iams Company (Butts, John)
October 31, 2007 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Madonna E. Cournoyer (Cournoyer, Madonna)
October 31, 2007 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony A.A. McGuinness on behalf of Nutro Products, Inc. (McGuinness, Anthony)
August 9, 2007 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean J. Milano on behalf of Target Corporation (Milano, Sean)
August 7, 2007 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Madonna E. Cournoyer on behalf of Nutro Products, Inc. (Cournoyer, Madonna)
July 23, 2007 14 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1 in MDL Case 1850 received from District of New Jersey requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2007 (Jones, Sherry).
July 23, 2007 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered ALLOWING 6 Stipulation, filed by Menu Foods Inc., Target Corporation, The Iams Company, Kimberly Mello, Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., ChemNutra Inc., Menu Foods Limited, Nutro Products, Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund, Megan Connerton (Lovett, Jarrett)
July 19, 2007 13 Copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1 in MDL Case 1850 received from the MDL Panel. (Jones, Sherry)
July 3, 2007 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Menu Foods Inc. served on 5/8/2007, answer due 5/28/2007. (Richard, Eugene)
July 3, 2007 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Menu Foods Midwest Corporation served on 5/8/2007, answer due 5/28/2007. (Richard, Eugene)
July 3, 2007 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Menu Foods Income Fund served on 5/8/2007, answer due 5/28/2007. (Richard, Eugene)
July 3, 2007 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Menu Foods Limited served on 5/8/2007, answer due 5/28/2007. (Richard, Eugene)
July 3, 2007 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Menu Foods Holdings, Inc. served on 5/8/2007, answer due 5/28/2007. (Richard, Eugene)
June 29, 2007 7 NOTICE by Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc. Notice of Potential Transfer of Potential Tag-Along Case and Request for Continuance of Stay of Disclosure (Attachments: # 1)(Lane, Maureen)
June 29, 2007 6 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying all Proceedings and for Preservation of Evidence by Nutro Products, Inc., Target Corporation, ChemNutra Inc., Megan Connerton, Kimberly Mello, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., The Iams Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lane, Maureen)
June 26, 2007 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Nutro Products, Inc. waiver sent on 5/3/2007, answer due 7/2/2007. (Richard, Eugene)
May 22, 2007 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Target Corporation waiver sent on 5/3/2007, answer due 7/2/2007. (Richard, Eugene)
May 22, 2007 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ChemNutra Inc. waiver sent on 5/3/2007, answer due 7/2/2007. (Richard, Eugene)
May 17, 2007 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed The Iams Company waiver sent on 5/3/2007, answer due 7/2/2007. (Richard, Eugene)
April 26, 2007 Summons Issued as to Nutro Products, Inc., Target Corporation, ChemNutra Inc., Xuzhou Anying Biologic Technology Development Company Ltd., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Inc., Menu Foods Holds, Inc., The Iams Company. (Nici, Richard)
April 26, 2007 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Sorokin (Nici, Richard)
April 25, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1496389, filed by Megan Connerton, Kimberly Mello. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Appendix Civil Cover Sheet Attachment# 3 Appendix Local Category Form)(Richard, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connerton et al v. Menu Foods Midwest Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Iams Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Sean J. Milano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xuzhou Anying Biologic Technology Development Company Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemNutra Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutro Products, Inc.
Represented By: Madonna E. Cournoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Mello
Represented By: Eugene R. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Connerton
Represented By: Eugene R. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?