In re: Stryker LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Amy Saunders, Paul Loizzo, Betsy Perez, Susan Purtell, Camilla Pakela, Debbie Brown, Helena Brett, Linda Land, Donna Siniff, Michael Travers, Andrzef Wyganowski, Jamie Paciolla, Gerard Logan, Russell Layne, Niels Foster, Christopher E Galloway, Paul Pfeufer, Ronald Stamper, Larry Powell, Barbara Moag, Cherise Austin-DeSota, Rolande Baker, Presley Middlebrooks, Edward S. Arrington, Dixie LaFary, Kenneth Davison, Eric C. Stevens, Administrative Counsel, Phillip D Simmons, Robin Miller, Pro Hac Vice Admission, Jerry Branyon, Joseph Mautino, Dennis Brown, Jeanne Brink, John Gley, Michael Pace, Nancy Soper, Joseph Gega, Sofia Stevens, Sherryadine Judd, Richard Fredette, Peggy Vishion, Donald Ray Lovell, Camille Mueller, Mary Jane Nelson, Mary Jean Pitts, Larry Hamilton, Carol Keller, Kameron Pillow, Genevieve Ann Porter-Levans, Beverly Johnson, Daniel Smeins, Rosanne Gmuer, Joan Ross, Carol B. Weis, Donna Churray, Mildred McGuire, Charles E. Gibson, Joseph O'Keefe, Douglas H Aitcheson, Ethelyn Rock, Aaron Powell, Helen Gribben, Robert Pakela, Shirlie Artwohl, Janet Nolton, Harry Steptoe, David L Johnson, Luz I Richardson, Janice O'Hare, Jeanette Zavota, Samuel Bumpus, Frank Palmer, Marie Pezak, Alice Grist, Karen Eddinger, Robert Haines, James A Zittel, Robert Schulz, Martin Star, Katherine Mautino, Sandra A. Kotecki, Arcangelo Drago, Gordon Williams, Dolores Egan, Richard C. Ninneman, Crystal Hayes, Linda Heskett, Phyllis Kerr, Judy Goodwin, KimberLee Aitcheson, Charles G Connor, Betty Shuman, Rachel Sellers, Peggy Sherman, Liliane Perez, Bob Kareis, Warren L. Cooper, Minnie S Woods, Jane Hicks, Christine McCooe, Allan R Gribben, Larry R. Schneider, Dennis Nolton, Jonathan Sellers, David Campbell, Thomas Bacon, Darryl Heskett, Christopher Hayes, Amy Leyva, Robert Green, Kenton Beachy, Kathy Cadavid, Beth A. Segerstrom, Janet Yaeger, Michael Schires, Joseph Abbanato, Robert Hanson, Douglas G Luster, Susan Lush, David T. Stewart, Charles Melle, James Dale, James M. Smith, John Gruver, Donald Belisle, Mary J Graham, Claire Gibson, Gladys Layne, Karen Rearick, Kathleen L. Bacon, Francis T. Hassett, Gail McGee, Gerald Churray, John Bortoli, Jane Schires, Sally Serrago, Joseph Driscoll, Florence K Chick, F. Michael Apicella, Bettina Powell, Ramon Guevara, Elliot Goldman, Barbara Meistad, Joseph Brett, Edward Butler, John Matthews, Wendall Yaeger, Thelma Smith, Robert Bridges, Matthew Egan, Nancy Hubbard, Plaintiffs' Executive Committee, Arne Oyre, Henry C. Rayburn, Derlia McFarland, Karla Smoot, Dorothy Kareis, Robert O'Hare, Curtis Hicks, Charles B. Robb, Sr., Pamela C. Quinn, Rosann Bridges, George Rendle, Connie Lou Dowzak, Darleen M Stewart, Stephen Schneyder, Tacsonia Baudoin, Donald Crowley, Pin Q. Brooks, Carmen S. Knudtson, Carol Mathews, Scott C. Hunter, Priscilla A. O'Keefe, Tamara A. Bauer, Kathleen Dawley, Dennis Hinz, Mark Trent, Susan Marvel, Carol P Chapko, Edward F. Proue, Leanne Halfman, James Crews, Paul Gibbs, Brent Brandon, Jackie L. Crimm, Charlotte Telgener, Beverly Landis, LeRoy Denne, Robert Andrukaitis, John Vander Sanden, Phyllis Smith, Douglas Brooks, Gerald Dawley, James Wischnewski, Joyce Ulrich, James Daniels, James M Stewart, Jane Shuman, Marsha Frost, Sharon Kalmback, Ronald Cote, Deborah Denne, Bernard Hoare, Marc Ledoux, Irma Atienzo, Joseph Moag, Stephen Metivier, Michael Pallos, Mark Irving, Pamela Keller, Barry Day, Bobby G Boyd, Randall Alex, Joann Brown, Terance Leah Pannette, Paul Grundy, Donna Branyon, Holly Ann Elkins, Sandra Dugan, Dorothy Baier, Cindy Howard, Ronald Pezak, Keith Baudoin, Claudine Mogg-Brandon, Michael Squicciarini, Edward Rearick, Thomas Dugan, Harry Levans, Jean Hester, Leonard Armand, Gerald J. Eobstel, Donna Dale, Kristie J. Russell, Daniel Keller, Janet Noennig, Peter Antinopoulos, Denise Henry, Ramona Guevara, Cindy F. Smith, Steven Dowzak, Lois Kolbosky, Debra McIntyre, Diane M. Johnson, Alan Kuehl, Peter Provenzano, William Krautwald, Dick McGee, Carol Ann Mayo, Susan Darling, Henry Cooney, Eleanor Zimny, Lawrence Diedrich, Donna Barker, Sara Thompson, Luis Cadavid, Kathleen Henry, Joseph Kotulka, Dick Darling, Douglas Brink, Sumpter Barker, Eugene Willard, Phyllis W Hammersley, William D'Orlando, Joan Travers, Lavonne Baker, Brock J. Richardson, Patricia Rendle, Rodger W. Stampfli, Robert Curtis, Kevin Meistad, Ralph Henry, Scott Shields, Jill Metivier, Leo Boutiette, Kathleen Delo, Jimmy Gordon, Jane Provenzano, Diane E. Kaub, Beth Ann Bark, Glenda Campbell, Edwin R. Brown, Susan B. Patterson, Lisa Goldman, Judith Venegoni, Phillippe J. Bolduc, Mary Joyce Ninneman, Betty S. Sadler, Paul Zinck, Daryl Gerber, Anthony Paciolla, Yanique Oyre, Robert Hosinski, Jude Garrett, Maria Sollers, John Frost, Ronald Kalmback, Paula Johnson, Curtis Brewer, Leo Eddinger, Bridget Arrington, Frances T Grant, Alma Carmichael, Denise White, James Johnson, Anna Marie Bortoli, Gloria Pace, Randy Hubbard, Jennifer Brewer, Donna Stewart, Jacqueline Wilson, Brenda Butler, Linda Regan, Jane Alice Burns, John Noennig, Larry R. Patterson, Joseph E Smith, Russell Tincher, Linda Diedrich, Suzanne B Beers, Colleen Harmon, Yvette D Cooper, Stewart C. Pelton, Walter Shuman, Carol Logan, Jean Westerlund, Charles Edward Haack, Kevin Gedrich, Sandy Back, Linda B Luster, Rhonda A Galloway, Patton Witt, Donald Wise, Ardis M. Proue, Carlos Rivera, Lee Ann Palmer, Tina Squicciarini, Judy Efird, Edward Beers, Kathrine Bryniarski, Rodolfo Magallanes, Jill Hinz, Steven M. Segerstrom, Amy Davidson, Richard Cardone, Donald E. Rodgers, Sabrina Allen, Sandra Williams, Susan Adelman, Jay F. Emmett, Mrs. Martha Rose, Mr. Robert D. Rose, David Goddu, Robert D. Rose, Martha Rose, Kathleen Goddu, Diane Maddock, Gerald Maddock, Betty Peavy, Jeff T. Jamieson, June M. Post, Elizabeth Irving, Larry Brown, Susan Connelly, David S Stevenson, Rodney V Teele, William C Steigerwald, Salvatore DiDomenico, JoAnne DiDomenico, Jerold O Berge, Lakeland Regional Health Systems, Inc., Patricia Hackett, Debra L Arisman, Jerry W Brown, MICHAL S STRUTIN, Dominick Caiazzo, MICHAEL SINENSKY, Marian E Caiazzo, Anna Maria Firicano and Warren L. Anderson
Defendant: Stryker LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation and Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Interested Party: Willard J. Moody
Case Number: 1:2017md02768
Filed: April 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 1012 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam G. Gutbezahl on behalf of Anna Maria Firicano (Gutbezahl, Adam)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1011 COMPLAINT Anderson against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 19-cv-11903, filed by Warren L. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Killion, Katie)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1010 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #1008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added George M. Kontos & Katie A. Killion. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1009 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Y. Weltman on behalf of Anna Maria Firicano (Weltman, Jeremy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1008 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Katie Killion and George Kontos Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7853116 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1007 Conditional Transfer order number 50 in MDL 2768 dated 8/28/19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1006 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-11820, filed by Anna Maria Firicano.(McKinley, Kent)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1005 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #1002 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Robert B. Sickels. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kinsella, Devan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1004 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER APPROVING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF THE STRYKER LFIT QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND. (Attachment: #1 Attachment) Modified on 8/7/2019 to separate attachment from order (Kinsella, Devan).
August 7, 2019 Filing 1003 Judge Indira Talwani: QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Kinsella, Devan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1002 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert Sickels Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7818224 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1001 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-11647, filed by Debra L Arisman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Goldstein, Brian)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1000 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-11628-IT, filed by Dominick Caiazzo, Marian E Caiazzo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Goldstein, Brian)
July 31, 2019 Filing 999 COMPLAINT against Jerry W Brown, Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-11627-IT, filed by Jerry W Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Goldstein, Brian)
July 25, 2019 Filing 998 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 19-11610, filed by MICHAEL SINENSKY, MICHAL S STRUTIN. (Attachments: #1 CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 LOCAL CATEGORY SHEET, #3 SUMMONS)(Devine, Brian)
July 11, 2019 Filing 997 NOTICE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. of FILING DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tedder, Gay)
July 8, 2019 Filing 996 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel Monthly Status Report (Raso, Ashleigh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 995 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-11268-IT, filed by Lakeland Regional Health Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form for New Civil Cases)(Sponsler, Warren)
July 3, 2019 Filing 994 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Administrative Counsel. Document received: Corrected Proposed Order. (Raso, Ashleigh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 993 MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Entry of a Qualified Protective Order by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raso, Ashleigh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 992 MOTION Motion to Approve the Establishment of the Stryker LFIT Qualified Settlement Fund and Appointment of Settlement Administrator by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit The Qualified Settlement Fund)(Raso, Ashleigh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 991 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Haag on behalf of Patricia Hackett (Haag, Eric)
July 2, 2019 Filing 990 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Taylor Wilkov on behalf of Harry Levans (Wilkov, Matthew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 989 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Civil action 1:19-cv-11268-IT. (Kinsella, Devan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 988 NOTICE by Lakeland Regional Health Systems, Inc. of Filing Motion to Lift the Stay Order, and Amended Motion to Remand, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay Order, and Amended Motion to Remand, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof)(Sponsler, Warren)
June 24, 2019 Filing 987 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Giovanni Bush on behalf of Lakeland Regional Health Systems, Inc. (Bush, Nicholas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 986 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren Kenneth Sponsler on behalf of Lakeland Regional Health Systems, Inc. (Sponsler, Warren)
June 21, 2019 Filing 985 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Giovanni Bush on behalf of Lakeland Regional Health Systems, Inc. (Bush, Nicholas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 984 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren Kenneth Sponsler on behalf of Lakeland Regional Health Systems, Inc. (Sponsler, Warren)
June 20, 2019 Filing 983 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Haag on behalf of Jerold O Berge (Haag, Eric)
June 19, 2019 Filing 982 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #979 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Alexander Dwyer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kinsella, Devan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 981 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #974 . Added Joseph M. Lyon. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kinsella, Devan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 980 Conditional Transfer order number 48 in MDL 2768 dated 6/19/19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
June 18, 2019 Filing 979 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alexander Dwyer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7738505 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 7, 2019 Filing 978 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel Monthly Status Report (Raso, Ashleigh)
June 7, 2019 Filing 977 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-11274, filed by William C Steigerwald. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Goldstein, Brian)
June 7, 2019 Filing 976 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-11275, filed by JoAnne DiDomenico, Salvatore DiDomenico. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Goldstein, Brian)
June 5, 2019 Filing 975 Transfer order in MDL 2768 dated 6/5/19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 29, 2019 Filing 974 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph M. Lyon Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7706569 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 973 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-11135, filed by Rodney V Teele. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Goldstein, Brian)
May 16, 2019 Filing 972 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-11127, filed by David S Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Goldstein, Brian)
May 16, 2019 Filing 971 Conditional Transfer order number 47 in MDL 2768 dated 5/16/19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 15, 2019 Filing 970 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #968 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Nicholas S. Clevenger. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kinsella, Devan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 969 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel Monthly Status Report (Raso, Ashleigh)
May 8, 2019 Filing 968 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nicholas S. Clevenger Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7675920 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
May 8, 2019 Filing 967 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER TERMINATING CIVIL ACTION 18-CV-11917Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:18-cv-11917-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
May 8, 2019 Filing 966 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #965 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael P. McGartland. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
May 2, 2019 Filing 965 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael P. McGartland Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7666318 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
May 1, 2019 Filing 964 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #963 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added T. Peyton Bell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
May 1, 2019 Filing 963 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of T. Peyton Bell Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7664719 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
May 1, 2019 Filing 962 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #959 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David Nathaniel Bigelow; ALLOWING #961 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christina T. Natale. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
May 1, 2019 Filing 961 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christina Natale Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7664052 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
April 18, 2019 Filing 960 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Kelley on behalf of Susan Connelly (Kelley, Walter)
April 15, 2019 Filing 959 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Bigelow Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7636381 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
April 10, 2019 Filing 958 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-10692, filed by Larry Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riegerix, Joseph)
April 10, 2019 Filing 957 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew McCarley on behalf of Elizabeth Irving (McCarley, Matthew)
April 10, 2019 Filing 956 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-10676, filed by Elizabeth Irving. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarley, Matthew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 955 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel Monthly Status Report (Raso, Ashleigh)
March 28, 2019 Filing 954 Conditional Transfer order number 46 in MDL 2768 dated 3/28/19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
March 27, 2019 Filing 953 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Douglas E. Chabot Notice of Change of Firm Name (Chabot, Douglas)
March 25, 2019 Filing 952 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:19-cv-10558, filed by Jeff T. Jamieson, June M. Post. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Categorization Form, #3 Summons)(Mann, Jonathan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 951 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 19-cv-10535, filed by Betty Peavy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nigh, Daniel)
March 14, 2019 Filing 950 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER TERMINATING CIVIL ACTION 19-cv-10376-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
March 14, 2019 Filing 949 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel A. Nash on behalf of Gerald Maddock (Nash, Joel)
March 13, 2019 Filing 948 Conditional Transfer order number 45 in MDL 2768 dated 3/13/19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
March 12, 2019 Filing 947 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-12553, filed by David Goddu, Kathleen Goddu.(Fitzgerald, Kevin)
March 12, 2019 Filing 946 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Martha Rose, Robert D. Rose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Guajardo, Michael)
March 12, 2019 Filing 945 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Guajardo on behalf of Martha Rose, Robert D. Rose (Guajardo, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 944 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel Monthly Status Report (Raso, Ashleigh)
February 7, 2019 Filing 943 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel Joint Monthly Status Report (Raso, Ashleigh)
February 6, 2019 Filing 942 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemarie Riddel Bogdan on behalf of Kathleen L. Bacon, Thomas Bacon (Riddel Bogdan, Rosemarie)
February 1, 2019 Filing 941 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 13 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
January 23, 2019 Filing 940 Conditional Transfer order number 43 in MDL 2768 dated 1/23/19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
January 16, 2019 Filing 939 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #938 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Vincent J. Moccio. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 15, 2019 Filing 938 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Vincent Moccio Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7494375 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 937 Conditional Transfer order number 42 in MDL 2768 dated 1/15/19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
January 9, 2019 Filing 936 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Goldstein on behalf of Douglas H Aitcheson, KimberLee Aitcheson (Goldstein, Brian)
January 8, 2019 Filing 935 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel Joint Monthly Status Report (Raso, Ashleigh)
January 8, 2019 Filing 934 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Saunders on behalf of Warren L. Cooper, Yvette D Cooper (Saunders, Joseph)
January 8, 2019 Filing 933 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #932 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rosemarie Riddell Bogdan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 7, 2019 Filing 932 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rosemarie Bogdan Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7482211 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 7, 2019 Filing 931 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #930 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joel A. Nash. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 4, 2019 Filing 930 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joel Nash Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7480133 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 2, 2019 Filing 929 NOTICE of Appearance by James Gaughan O'Callahan on behalf of Stephen Schneyder (O'Callahan, James)
December 26, 2018 Filing 928 Conditional Transfer order number 41 in MDL 2768 dated 12/21/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
December 17, 2018 Filing 927 Conditional Transfer order number 40 in MDL 2768 dated 12/14/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
December 14, 2018 Filing 926 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Tadtman on behalf of Camille Mueller (Tadtman, Brian)
December 14, 2018 Filing 925 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #923 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lawrence J. Scanlon. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
December 14, 2018 Filing 924 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Houlihan on behalf of Rivera Carlos (Houlihan, Christopher)
December 13, 2018 Filing 923 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lawrence Scanlon Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7453949 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
December 12, 2018 Filing 922 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #921 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian E. Tadtman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
December 11, 2018 Filing 921 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian E. Tadtman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7448818 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
December 11, 2018 Filing 920 Conditional Transfer order number 39 in MDL 2768 dated 12/11/18 the mdl panel from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
December 7, 2018 Filing 919 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel re #880 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF MDL ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FROM THE SHARING AND FUNDING OF PLAINTIFFS COMMON BENEFIT TIME AND EXPENSE Proposed Order (Raso, Ashleigh)
December 7, 2018 Filing 918 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel Joint Monthly Status Report (Raso, Ashleigh)
December 6, 2018 Filing 917 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #914 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Susan A. Faunce. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
December 4, 2018 Filing 916 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Newman on behalf of Harry Levans, Genevieve Ann Porter-Levans (Newman, Brian)
December 4, 2018 Filing 915 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-cv-12491, filed by Harry Levans, Genevieve Ann Porter-Levans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet for Complaint)(Newman, Brian)
December 4, 2018 Filing 914 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Susan A. Faunce Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7439107 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
December 3, 2018 Filing 913 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre F. Toce on behalf of Jude Garrett (Toce, Andre)
November 30, 2018 Filing 912 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobby J Bell, Jr on behalf of MICHAEL PACE (Bell, Bobby)
November 30, 2018 Filing 911 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Waite on behalf of Charles B. Robb, Sr (Waite, Adam)
November 28, 2018 Filing 910 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #908 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher Caldwell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 28, 2018 Filing 909 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #907 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Adam Waite. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 27, 2018 Filing 908 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher Caldwell Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7428701 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh) (Main Document 908 replaced on 11/28/2018 with a corrected version) (DaSilva, Carolina).
November 27, 2018 Filing 907 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adam Waite Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7428700 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 27, 2018 Filing 906 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #904 Motion for Extension of Time to December 7, 2018, to File Proposed Common Benefit Order. The court does not anticipate granting further extensions of this deadline. (MacDonald, Gail)
November 27, 2018 Filing 905 Conditional Transfer order number 38 in MDL 2768 dated 11/27/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
November 26, 2018 Filing 904 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to December 7, 2018 to File Proposed Common Benefit Order by Howmedica Osteonics Corp..(Catullo, Kim)
November 26, 2018 Filing 903 Conditional Transfer order number 37 in MDL 2768 dated 11/26/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
November 20, 2018 Filing 902 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #901 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian T. Newman, and Mathew Taylor Wilkov. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 19, 2018 Filing 901 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian T. Newman, Mathew Taylor Wilkov Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7418335 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 19, 2018 Filing 900 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Wallace on behalf of Joseph E Smith (Wallace, David)
November 14, 2018 Filing 898 NOTICE of Appearance by Revital B. Braun on behalf of Judy Efird (Braun, Revital)
November 14, 2018 Filing 897 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #896 MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/27/18 to File Proposed Common Benefit Order (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 13, 2018 Filing 899 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER TERMINATING CIVIL ACTION 18-CV-11831-IT Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:18-cv-11831-IT (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 13, 2018 Filing 896 MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/27/18 to File Proposed Common Benefit Order by Administrative Counsel.(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 9, 2018 Filing 895 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 9, 2018 Filing 894 Transcript of Status Conference held on November 2, 2018, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net Redaction Request due 11/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 9, 2018 Filing 893 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #892 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David L. Wallace. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 8, 2018 Filing 892 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of DAVID L. WALLACE, Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7405314 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 8, 2018 Filing 891 Conditional Transfer order number 36 in MDL 2768 dated 11/8/18 the mdl panel from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
November 6, 2018 Filing 890 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Diamond on behalf of Christopher E Galloway, Rhonda A Galloway (Diamond, David)
November 2, 2018 Filing 889 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER AIDING PRIVATE SETTLEMENT Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
November 2, 2018 Filing 888 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 11/2/2018. Case called. Defendant reports confidential and private settlement re: certain cases. Archer Systems will act as settlement administrator. Correspondence from counsel pertinent to settlement will issue to all plaintiffs. Discovery shall be stayed through 7/31/19, so walk-away rights or settlements can be confirmed. Monthly status reports to be filed and status confs. may be set, if needed. Plaintiffs' MOTION #837 to Reduce Bellwether Trial Pool terminated without prejudice in light of stay. Proposed Orders in re: to the Common Benefit Motion #880 due 11/13/18. Order re: settlement to follow. (Court Reporter: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net.) (Attorneys present: Kelley, Walter; Relkin, Ellen; Flowers, Peter; Raso Ashleigh; Catullo, Kim; Benton, Danae; Blakely, MJ; Boone, Alexandra; Braun, Revital; Campbell, Todd; DeGaris, Annesley; Diamond, Marie; Fitzgerald, Kevin; Groy, Gail C.; Hendricks, Sean; Hogins, Johnathan; Johnston, Jason; Leathers, Daniel; Ledgard, Don; Puccio, Karen; McDonough, Brendan; Modl, Michael; Munson, Matthew; Robinson, Steven; Rojas, Rachal; Schem, Ronald; Schlueter, Richard; Smith, Ashton; Szerlag, David; Vaage, Per; Valente, James; Williams, Jessica) (MacDonald, Gail)
November 2, 2018 Filing 887 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Document received: [Proposed] Order Aiding Private Settlement. (Asfendis, Paul)
November 1, 2018 Filing 886 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Munson on behalf of Joseph Brett (Munson, Matthew)
November 1, 2018 Filing 885 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #883 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Andre F. Toce; ALLOWING #884 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David J. Diamond. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
October 31, 2018 Filing 884 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David J. Diamond Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7391234 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 31, 2018 Filing 883 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andre F. Toce Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7389749 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 30, 2018 Filing 882 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #879 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matthew E. Munson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
October 29, 2018 Filing 881 MEMORANDUM in Support re #880 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF MDL ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FROM THE SHARING AND FUNDING OF PLAINTIFFS COMMON BENEFIT TIME AND EXPENSE filed by Administrative Counsel. (Raso, Ashleigh)
October 29, 2018 Filing 880 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF MDL ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FROM THE SHARING AND FUNDING OF PLAINTIFFS COMMON BENEFIT TIME AND EXPENSE by Administrative Counsel.(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 29, 2018 Filing 879 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mathew Munson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7385445 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 29, 2018 Filing 878 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #874 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Eric Haag; ALLOWING #876 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John Fabry. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
October 26, 2018 Filing 877 Proposed Agenda by Administrative Counsel (Raso, Ashleigh) (Modified on 10/29/2018 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew).
October 25, 2018 Filing 876 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Fabry Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7382358 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 875 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Goldstein on behalf of Phyllis Smith (Goldstein, Jason)
October 25, 2018 Filing 874 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Eric Haag Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7382110 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 22, 2018 Filing 873 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-12194, filed by Denise Henry, Ralph Henry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zimmermann, Benjamin)
October 22, 2018 Filing 872 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-12193, filed by Arcangelo Drago. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zimmermann, Benjamin)
October 19, 2018 Filing 871 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #869 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jason S. Goldstein ; ALLOWING #870 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Bobby Bell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
October 18, 2018 Filing 870 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Bobby Bell Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7371836 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 18, 2018 Filing 869 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jason S. Goldstein Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7370967 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 17, 2018 Filing 868 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy R. Fietz on behalf of Frances T Grant (Fietz, Jeremy)
October 15, 2018 Filing 867 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #866 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matthew Doebler. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
October 12, 2018 Filing 866 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mathew Doebler Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7364011 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 865 Conditional Transfer order number 35 in MDL 2768 dated 10/12/2018 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 12, 2018 Filing 864 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER TERMINATING CIVIL ACTION 18-CV-11920-ITAssociated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:18-cv-11920-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
October 12, 2018 Filing 863 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #861 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joseph Dell; ALLOWING #862 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kristen Sinnott. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
October 12, 2018 Filing 862 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kristen Sinnott Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7362646 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 861 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph Dell Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7362639 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 9, 2018 Filing 860 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Rosenbaum on behalf of Robert Haines (Rosenbaum, Craig)
October 9, 2018 Filing 859 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #856 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Patrick M. Regan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
October 9, 2018 Filing 858 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Wright on behalf of Jennifer Brewer, Curtis Brewer (Wright, Richard)
October 8, 2018 Filing 857 NOTICE of Appearance by Don Ledgard on behalf of Bettina Powell, Larry Powell (Ledgard, Don)
October 5, 2018 Filing 856 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Patrick M. Regan Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7354405 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 1, 2018 Filing 855 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER TERMINATING CIVIL ACTION 18-CV-11627-ITAssociated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:18-cv-11627-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
September 28, 2018 Filing 854 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Darryl Heskett, Linda Heskett (Braun, Revital) Member case 18-cv-11627 closed on 10/1/2018 ( (DaSilva, Carolina).
September 27, 2018 Filing 853 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Saunders on behalf of Edward Beers, Suzanne B Beers (Saunders, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Filing 852 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex J. Brown on behalf of Sabrina Allen, James Crew, Paul Grundy, Derlia McFarland, Debra McIntyre, Terance Leah Pannette, Ronald Stamper, Donald Wise,Shirlie Artwohl (Brown, Alex) (Main Document 852 replaced on 10/3/2018 to include schedule of actions) (DaSilva, Carolina).
September 24, 2018 Filing 851 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Fitzgerald on behalf of Kenneth Davison (Fitzgerald, Kevin)
September 24, 2018 Filing 850 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Leathers on behalf of Richard Cardone (Leathers, Daniel)
September 19, 2018 Filing 849 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl D. Campbell, III on behalf of Sandra A. Kotecki (Campbell, III, Carl D.)
September 18, 2018 Filing 847 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan A. Keane on behalf of Cherise Austin-DeSota, Peggy Vishion (Keane, Ryan)
September 18, 2018 Filing 846 NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Status Conference set for 9/27/18 is RESET for 11/2/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
September 17, 2018 Filing 845 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #844 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel R. Leathers. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
September 13, 2018 Filing 844 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel R. Leathers Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7317527 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
September 13, 2018 Filing 843 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald P McKenna, Jr on behalf of Andrzef Wyganowski (McKenna, Donald)
September 12, 2018 Filing 842 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Lawrence Puccio on behalf of Andrzef Wyganowski (Puccio, Karen)
September 12, 2018 Filing 841 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #840 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Steven C. Ruth. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
September 11, 2018 Filing 840 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Steven Ruth Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7314141 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
September 7, 2018 Filing 839 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #836 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Don McKenna and Karen Lawrence Puccio. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
September 6, 2018 Filing 838 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to #837 MOTION to Reduce Bellwether Trial Pool by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Apjohn, Nelson) Modified text and docket entry relationships on 9/7/2018 (DaSilva, Carolina).
September 6, 2018 Filing 837 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Reduce Bellwether Trial Pool (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Bellwether Chart, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Bellwether Data)(Raso, Ashleigh) Modified text and event type on 9/7/2018 (DaSilva, Carolina).
September 6, 2018 Filing 836 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Karen Lawrence Puccio and Don McKenna Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7307669 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
September 5, 2018 Filing 834 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #833 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alex J. Brown. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
September 4, 2018 Filing 833 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alex Brown Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7303382 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
September 4, 2018 Filing 832 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #831 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeremy R. Fietz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 30, 2018 Filing 831 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adam Fietz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7298736 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
August 29, 2018 Filing 830 NOTICE of Appearance by Revital B. Braun on behalf of Marie Pezak, Ronald Pezak (Braun, Revital)
August 29, 2018 Filing 829 NOTICE of Appearance by Revital B. Braun on behalf of Dixie LaFary, Presley Middlebrooks, Harry Steptoe (Braun, Revital)
August 24, 2018 Filing 828 NOTICE of Appearance by Revital B. Braun on behalf of Darryl Heskett, Linda Heskett (Braun, Revital)
August 24, 2018 Filing 827 NOTICE of Appearance by Revital B. Braun on behalf of Irma Atienzo, Robert Green, Scott C. Hunter, Diane M. Johnson, Bob Kareis, Beverly Landis, Gloria Pace, Betsy Perez, Denise White (Braun, Revital)
August 24, 2018 Filing 826 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorothy J. Dohanics on behalf of Florence K Chick (Dohanics, Dorothy)
August 21, 2018 Filing 825 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert K Jenner on behalf of Douglas G Luster, Linda B Luster (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jenner, Robert)
August 17, 2018 Filing 824 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Upon consideration of Defendant's #741 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Entry of Order Regarding Defendant's Contacts with Physician-Experts and #794 Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Entry of Order Regarding Defendant's Contacts with Physician-Experts, Plaintiffs' #742 Motion for Protective Order to Preclude Defendant from Retaining Treating Physicians as Expert Witnesses, and oral argument of counsel, the motions are ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. See attached Order Precluding the Use of Identified Physicians as Experts and Permitting the Use of Nontreating Physicians in Affiliated Medical Practice Groups. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 16, 2018 Filing 823 NOTICE of Appearance by Revital B. Braun on behalf of Denise White (Braun, Revital)
August 16, 2018 Filing 822 NOTICE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. of Proposed Order Regarding Defendants Contacts With Treating Physician-Experts (Ferrera, David)
August 15, 2018 Filing 821 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #811 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Tayjes Shah; ALLOWING #815 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Roopal P. Luhana; ALLOWING #820 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Dorothy Dohanics. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 14, 2018 Filing 820 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Dorothy Dohanics Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7274575 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
August 13, 2018 Filing 819 NOTICE of Appearance by Alia M. Abdi on behalf of Beverly Johnson, James Johnson (Abdi, Alia)
August 13, 2018 Filing 818 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Rosenbaum on behalf of Robert Haines (Rosenbaum, Craig)
August 13, 2018 Filing 817 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 13, 2018 Filing 816 Transcript of Status Conference held on August 2, 2018, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 9/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 9, 2018 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $100.00 paid on 08/08/2018, receipt number 0101-7266058. (Tran, Henry)
August 8, 2018 Filing 815 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Roopal P. Luhana Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7266060 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 814 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Lisa S. Lee (Lee, Lisa)
August 8, 2018 Filing 813 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Lisa S. Lee (Lee, Lisa)
August 8, 2018 Filing 812 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #792 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alia M. Abdi. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 8, 2018 Filing 811 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tayjes Shah Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7265580 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
August 7, 2018 Filing 810 Set Deadlines: Fact Discovery to be completed by 2/1/2019. Summary Judgment Motions due by 9/23/2019 (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 7, 2018 Filing 809 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. AMENDED Case Management Order No. 3 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
August 6, 2018 Filing 808 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #806 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James Pross and Braden Clement. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 3, 2018 Filing 806 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James Pross and Braden Clement Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7259371 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Motion for James Pross, #3 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
August 2, 2018 Filing 807 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 8/2/2018. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel re: 1. Form of Order in re: to Experts, Practice Group; parties to submit by 8/16/18; 2. Extension of deadlines: Proposed dates adopted. Any issues to be address at next Status Conf.; 3. Request for reduction of bell wether case pool. Counsel shall submit charts w/the 18 cases listed with their argument. Submissions due 9/6/18. Next Status Conference set for 9/27/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.) (Attorneys present: On phone: Ayala, Thomas; Benton, Danae; Blakely, MJ; Boone, Alexandra; Chabot, Douglas; Courson, Lisa Littell; De, Garis, Annesley; Diamond, Marie; Fitzgerald, Kevin; Gardner, Andrew; Groy, Gail C.; Hart, Paul; Hendricks, Sean; Hogins, Johnathan; Hubbard, Heidi (Def.); Johnston, Jason; Kinsley, Brian; Mann, Jon; McDonough, Brendan; Modl, Michael; Moody, Willard; Moore, Jennifer; OLeary, Leslie; Riegerix, Joseph; Robinson, Steven; Rojas, Rachal; Saunders, Joseph; Schafle, Michael; Schem, Ronald; Schlueter, Richard; Slater, Shayna; Smith, Ashton; Talley, Stuart; Vaage, Per; Weintrab, Adam; Williams, Jessica. In court: Raso, Kelley, Flowers, Catullo, Deutsch, Apjohn) (MacDonald, Gail)
August 1, 2018 Filing 805 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12558-IT , filed by Jay F. Emmett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Davis, Alex) Modified party complaint against and member case number on 8/2/2018 (DaSilva, Carolina).
August 1, 2018 Filing 804 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12559-IT , filed by Carol P Chapko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Davis, Alex) Modified party complaint filed against and member case number on 8/2/2018 (DaSilva, Carolina).
July 31, 2018 Filing 803 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-11617, filed by Gloria Pace.(Ayala, Thomas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 802 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-11616, filed by Scott C. Hunter.(Ayala, Thomas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 801 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-11615, filed by Betsy Perez.(Ayala, Thomas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 800 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-11613, filed by Denise White.(Ayala, Thomas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 799 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Riegerix on behalf of Aaron Powell (Riegerix, Joseph)
July 27, 2018 Filing 798 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex C. Davis on behalf of James A Zittel (Davis, Alex)
July 27, 2018 Filing 797 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard S. Ross on behalf of Kevin Gedrich (Ross, Howard)
July 26, 2018 Filing 796 NOTICE of Appearance by Ilyas Sayeg on behalf of Paul Zinck (Sayeg, Ilyas)
July 26, 2018 Filing 795 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Deadlines Set Forth in Case Management Order No. 3 and Second Amended Case Management Order No. 4 by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart of Proposed Modifications to Schedule)(Williams, Gene)
July 26, 2018 Filing 794 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #741 MOTION Entry of Order Regarding Defendants' Contacts with Physician-Experts filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Williams, Gene)
July 26, 2018 Filing 793 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Document received: Proposed Agenda for August 2, 2018 MDL Case Management Conference. (Williams, Gene)
July 26, 2018 Filing 792 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alia Abdi Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7247872 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
July 26, 2018 Filing 791 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #789 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard J. Arsenaul; ALLOWING #790 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Carl D. Campbell, II. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
July 25, 2018 Filing 790 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Carl D. Todd Campbell, III Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7245520 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
July 25, 2018 Filing 789 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard Arsenault Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7245509 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
July 24, 2018 Filing 788 NOTICE of Appearance by Danae Benton on behalf of Robin Miller (Benton, Danae)
July 20, 2018 Filing 787 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #786 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joseph R. Riegerix. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
July 19, 2018 Filing 786 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph Riegerix Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7237631 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
July 18, 2018 Filing 781 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Carmen S. Knudtson by Carmen S. Knudtson. (O'Leary, Leslie)
July 17, 2018 Filing 780 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-11479, filed by Gerald J. Eobstel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fleishman, Wendy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/18/2018 due to fillable format) (DaSilva, Carolina).
July 17, 2018 Filing 779 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #777 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard A. Wright. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
July 16, 2018 Filing 778 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp., John Gley (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-cv-10237, filed by John Gley.(Polito, Humbert) Modified member case number on 7/16/2018 (DaSilva, Carolina).
July 16, 2018 Filing 777 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard Wright Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7231075 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
July 10, 2018 Filing 776 Conditional Transfer order number 34 in MDL 2768 dated 7/10/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
July 6, 2018 Filing 774 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #773 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ilyas Sayeg. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
July 4, 2018 Filing 773 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ilyas Sayeg Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7215767 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 28, 2018 Filing 771 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Werkema on behalf of Robin Miller (Werkema, Holly)
June 27, 2018 Filing 770 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #768 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Danae Benton; ALLOWING #769 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Holly Werkema. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
June 26, 2018 Filing 769 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Holly Werkema Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7202909 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 26, 2018 Filing 768 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Danae Benton Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7202903 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 25, 2018 Filing 767 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #766 Motion to Continue JUNE 28, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE. (MacDonald, Gail)
June 22, 2018 Filing 766 Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference to 8/2/18 by Administrative Counsel.(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 22, 2018 Filing 765 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Saunders on behalf of Charles G Connor (Saunders, Joseph)
June 21, 2018 Filing 764 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Mismash on behalf of Ethelyn Rock(Mismash, Nancy) Modified text on 6/21/2018 (DaSilva, Carolina).
June 18, 2018 Filing 763 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Moore on behalf of Jane Alice Burns (Moore, Jennifer)
June 18, 2018 Filing 762 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashton Rose Smith on behalf of Jane Alice Burns (Smith, Ashton)
June 15, 2018 Filing 761 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie W O'Leary on behalf of Kristie J. Russell (O'Leary, Leslie)
June 15, 2018 Filing 760 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #757 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ashton Rose Smith; ALLOWING #758 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jennifer A. Moore. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
June 14, 2018 Filing 759 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra V. Boone on behalf of Bobby G Boyd (Boone, Alexandra)
June 14, 2018 Filing 758 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jennifer A. Moore Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7185775 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 14, 2018 Filing 757 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ashton Smith Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7185769 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 13, 2018 Filing 756 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #753 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alexandra V. Boone. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
June 13, 2018 Filing 755 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-cv-11101, filed by Charles B. Robb, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Valente, James) Modified text and party complaint filed against on 6/13/2018 (DaSilva, Carolina).
June 12, 2018 Filing 754 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Valente on behalf of Charles B. Robb, Sr (Valente, James) Relates to 18-cv-11101-IT
June 12, 2018 Filing 753 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alexandra V. Boone Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7181654 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
June 7, 2018 Filing 752 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 7, 2018 Filing 751 SEALED Transcript of Sealed Ex Parte Hearing held on May 31, 2018, before Judge Indira Talwani. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 7, 2018 Filing 750 Transcript of Status Conference held on May 31, 2018, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 6/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 6, 2018 Filing 749 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-11189-IT, filed by Donna Siniff.(DeGaris, Annesley)
June 5, 2018 Filing 748 NOTICE of Appearance by Altom Michael Maglio on behalf of Carol Mathews (Maglio, Altom)
June 4, 2018 Filing 747 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #746 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Altom Maglio. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
June 1, 2018 Filing 746 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Altom Maglio Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7167111 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
May 31, 2018 Filing 745 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #741 MOTION Entry of Order Regarding Defendants' Contacts with Physician-Experts filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Defendant to provide additional information as set forth in the May 31, 2018 hearing, by or before 7/26/18. (MacDonald, Gail)
May 31, 2018 Filing 744 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 5/31/2018. Case called. Court has colloquy with Counsel re: Update on MDL filings, Discovery Update, and Motion for Order regarding Defendants Contact with Physician-Experts as Briefed by theParties #741 ; ruling on motion is deferred, Defendants to provide additional information. Status Conference set for 6/28/2018 at 11:00 AM RESET for 04:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Status Conference set for 7/26/18 is RESET for 8/2/2018 04:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.) (Attorneys present: Nelson G. Apjohn; Michael J. Blakely, Jr.; Nicholas N. Deutsch; Peter J. Flowers; Heidi K. Hubbard; Walter Kelley; Ashleigh Elizabeth Raso; Ellen Relkin; Gene M. Williams; Courson, Lisa Littell; Crone, John; DeGaris, Annesley; Gardner, Andrew; Groy, Gail C.; Hart, Paul; Hogins, Johnathan; Johnston, Jason; McDonough, Brendan; McGlamry, Mike; McKeever, Jerome; Modl, Michael; Moody, Willard; Osborne, Joe; Riley, Stephanie; Robinson, Steven; Schafle, Michael; Schlueter, Richard; Slater, Shayna; Vaage, Per; Weintrab, Adam) (MacDonald, Gail)
May 25, 2018 Filing 743 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-11115, filed by Ramon Guevara, Ramona Guevara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeGaris, Annesley)
May 24, 2018 Filing 742 MOTION for Protective Order To Preclude Defendant From Retaining Treating Physicians as Expert Witnesses by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Raso, Ashleigh)
May 24, 2018 Filing 741 MOTION Entry of Order Regarding Defendants' Contacts with Physician-Experts by Howmedica Osteonics Corp..(Williams, Gene)
May 24, 2018 Filing 740 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Document received: Agenda for May 31, 2018 MDL Case Management Conference. (Williams, Gene)
May 24, 2018 Filing 739 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel T. Faxon on behalf of Jill Metivier, Stephen Metivier (Faxon, Joel)
May 23, 2018 Filing 738 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany S. Cates on behalf of Jill Metivier, Stephen Metivier (Cates, Brittany)
May 23, 2018 Filing 737 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #734 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joel T. Faxon. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
May 23, 2018 Filing 736 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-10983-IT, filed by Stephen Metivier, Jill Metivier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cates, Brittany)
May 23, 2018 Filing 735 Conditional Transfer order number 33 in MDL 2768 dated the mdl panel from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 22, 2018 Filing 734 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joel Faxon Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7152276 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
May 22, 2018 Filing 733 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Paul Hart, III on behalf of William Krautwald (Hart, Ronald)
May 15, 2018 Filing 732 Conditional Transfer order number 32 in MDL 2768 dated the mdl panel from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 14, 2018 Filing 731 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas E. Chabot on behalf of Mary J Graham (Chabot, Douglas)
May 11, 2018 Filing 730 COMPLAINT Short Form against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-10942, filed by Cherise Austin-DeSota.(Keane, Ryan)
May 11, 2018 Filing 729 COMPLAINT Short Form against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-10941, filed by Peggy Vishion.(Keane, Ryan)
May 7, 2018 Filing 728 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-10906, filed by Kevin Meistad, Barbara Meistad. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Szerlag, David)
May 7, 2018 Filing 727 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-cv-10908, filed by Brock J. Richardson, Luz I Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Szerlag, David)
May 7, 2018 Filing 726 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-cv-10911, filed by James M Stewart, Darleen M Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Szerlag, David)
May 7, 2018 Filing 725 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome W McKeever on behalf of Robert Hosinski (McKeever, Jerome)
May 7, 2018 Filing 724 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin R. Zimmermann on behalf of Sandra Dugan, Thomas Dugan (Zimmermann, Benjamin)
May 4, 2018 Filing 723 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #722 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added E. James Shepherd. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
May 4, 2018 Filing 722 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of E. James Shepherd Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7123785 by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing for E. James Shepherd)(Williams, Gene) Modified receipt number on 5/4/2018 (DaSilva, Carolina).
May 3, 2018 Filing 721 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Zick on behalf of Diane E. Kaub (Zick, John)
May 3, 2018 Filing 720 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-10831, filed by Robin Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daniel, Sindhu)
May 2, 2018 Filing 719 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W. Morgan on behalf of Robert Hosinski (Morgan, Richard)
May 2, 2018 Filing 718 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-10777, filed by Robert Hosinski.(Morgan, Richard)
May 2, 2018 Filing 717 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #716 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John A. Zick. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
May 1, 2018 Filing 716 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John A. Zick Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7119796 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
April 30, 2018 Filing 715 NOTICE of Appearance by Les Weisbrod on behalf of Bobby G Boyd (Weisbrod, Les) Relates to 18-cv-10841-IT (DaSilva, Carolina).
April 30, 2018 Filing 714 Conditional Transfer order number 31 in MDL 2768 dated 4/30/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
April 30, 2018 Filing 713 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Burke on behalf of Judy Goodwin (Burke, Daniel)
April 27, 2018 Filing 712 NOTICE of Appearance by Sindhu S. Daniel on behalf of Robin miller (Daniel, Sindhu)
April 26, 2018 Filing 711 NOTICE of Appearance by Gay L. Tedder on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Tedder, Gay)
April 26, 2018 Filing 710 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-10808, filed by Joseph Moag, Barbara Moag. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Blakely, Jr., Michael)
April 26, 2018 Filing 709 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-10807, filed by James Daniels. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Blakely, Jr., Michael)
April 25, 2018 Filing 708 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #707 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Les Weisbrod. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
April 24, 2018 Filing 707 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lee Weisbrod Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7108237 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
April 24, 2018 Filing 706 Conditional Transfer order number 30 in MDL 2768 dated the mdl panel from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
April 19, 2018 Filing 705 Conditional Transfer order number 29 in MDL 2768 dated 4/19/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
April 18, 2018 Filing 704 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #703 Motion for Extension of Time to May 24, 2018, to File Briefs Regarding Defendant's Contact with Physician Experts. (MacDonald, Gail)
April 17, 2018 Filing 703 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 24, 2018 to File Briefs Regarding Defendant's Contact with Physician Experts by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Gene)
April 17, 2018 Filing 702 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The parties have agreed to the following: The Status Conference set for 04/26/2018 is CANCELED. The next Status Conference will be held on 05/31/2018, at 11:00 a.m. (MacDonald, Gail)
April 12, 2018 Filing 701 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 12, 2018 Filing 700 Transcript of Hearing on Discovery Issues held on April 9, 2018, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 5/3/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 9, 2018 Filing 699 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Hearing held on 4/9/2018. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel re: discovery. Order to follow. The next Status Conference set for 4/26/18 at 11:00 a.m. will be rescheduled to 2:00 p.m. Counsel may jointly request of the clerk by c.o.b. April 18 that the 4/26/18 Status Conf. be canceled. The next standing Status Conf. is set for 11:00 a.m. on May 31, 2018. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Flowers, Kelley, Gallant, Blakely, Raso, McDonough, Warriner, Ferrera, Deutsch, Catullo, Asfendis) (MacDonald, Gail)
April 6, 2018 Filing 698 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-10671, filed by Lavonne Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allison, John)
April 6, 2018 Filing 697 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #696 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel C. Burke. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
April 5, 2018 Filing 696 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel Burke Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7083118 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
April 3, 2018 Filing 695 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Gorshe on behalf of Mary Jane Nelson (Gorshe, Lisa)
April 3, 2018 Filing 694 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 3, 2018 Filing 693 Transcript of Status Conference held on March 29, 2018, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 4/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
March 29, 2018 Filing 692 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 3/29/2018. Case called. Plaintiffs report 228 cases now filed in this MDL. Plaintiffs to draft list of disputed document production items, confer w/Defendants, and file an Agreed-Upon Statement by c.o.b. 4/4/18. Hearing on that Statement set for 4/9/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Parties to produce a list of the 27 deposition notices in re: to the disputed Committee and Meeting Minutes. Parties report that all state court litigation is on track. Re: Bellwhether cases, Plaintiffs file a Jurisdictional Chart in open court. Two cases are reported. Treating Physician list to be submitted on 4/17/18. At the next Status Conf. on 4/26/18 at 11:00 a.m., Court will hold an ex parte hearing in re: to a Proposal for Common Benefit Fund; documents shall be filed in advance. MJ Dein shall serve in re: to settlement judge. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Flowers, Kelley, Blakely, Raso, Williams, Deutsch, Catullo, Apjohn, Curry, Tefford, Bell, DeGaris, Diamond, Fitzgerald, Groy, Hendricks, McDonough, Modl, Robinson, Slater, Weintraub, Williams, Johnston, Riley) (MacDonald, Gail)
March 29, 2018 Filing 691 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #690 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael G. Guajardo. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
March 28, 2018 Filing 690 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael G. Guajardo Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7070419 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
March 28, 2018 Filing 689 Conditional Transfer order number 28 in MDL 2768 dated 3/28/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
March 28, 2018 Filing 688 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #687 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lisa Ann Gorshe. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
March 27, 2018 Filing 687 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lisa Gorshe Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7068426 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
March 22, 2018 Filing 686 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Document received: Proposed Agenda. (Williams, Gene)
March 16, 2018 Filing 685 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
March 16, 2018 Filing 684 Transcript of Status Conference held on March 2, 2018, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 4/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
March 9, 2018 Filing 683 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobby Saadian on behalf of Robert Curtis (Saadian, Bobby)
March 7, 2018 Filing 682 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #681 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Damon B. Willis. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
March 5, 2018 Filing 681 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Damon Willis Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7035336 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/7/2018 to remove blank page) (DaSilva, Carolina).
March 2, 2018 Filing 680 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SECOND AMENDED Case Management Order No. 4 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
March 2, 2018 Filing 679 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 3/2/2018; argument given re exparte contact with implanting and treating physicians of which the Court will issue an Order; treating physicians as experts issue tabled for next conference; Bellwether process reported as progressing; document production ongoing and being reviewed; email production has begun; Court is maintaining current schedule; discovery disputes tabled for next conference; status of Florida and Massachusetts matters addressed; next Status Conference set for 3/29/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Ayala, Campbell, Courson, Diamond, Fitzgerald, Flowers, Gardner, Johnston, Lee, Mann, Relkin, Robinson, Rojas, Saunders, Schafle, Slater, Szerlag, Weinraub, Williams, Osborne, Catullo, DeGaris, Deutsch, Ferrera, Hubbard, Kelley, Raso, Wadhwani, and Williams) (Lovett, Jarrett)
February 28, 2018 Filing 678 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #676 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Trevor B. Rockstad; ALLOWING #677 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added E. Scott Verhine. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
February 28, 2018 Filing 677 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Scott Verhine Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7028776 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
February 27, 2018 Filing 676 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Trevor B. Rockstad Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7025967 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
February 26, 2018 Filing 675 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Nicholas N. Deutsch (Deutsch, Nicholas)
February 23, 2018 Filing 674 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Document received: Proposed Agenda for 03/02/2018 MDL Case Management Conference. (Deutsch, Nicholas)
February 21, 2018 Filing 673 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Rosenbaum on behalf of Robert Haines (Rosenbaum, Craig)
February 15, 2018 Filing 672 NOTICE of Appearance by Per C. Vaage on behalf of Ronald Cote (Vaage, Per)
February 15, 2018 Filing 671 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Sarli on behalf of Ronald Cote (Sarli, Michael)
February 14, 2018 Filing 670 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel Plaintiffs' Bellwether Selection (Raso, Ashleigh)
February 14, 2018 Filing 669 NOTICE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Selections for Inclusion in Initial Bellwether Discovery Pool (Ferrera, David)
February 14, 2018 Filing 668 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-cv-10239-IT , filed by Ronald Cote.(Sarli, Michael) Modified member case number and filer on 2/15/2018 (DaSilva, Carolina).
February 14, 2018 Filing 667 DUPLICATIVE FILING. See #665 Notice of Appearance by Michael G. Sarli on behalf of Phillippe J. Bolduc (Sarli, Michael) (DaSilva, Carolina).
February 14, 2018 Filing 666 DUPLICATIVE FILING. See #664 Notice of Appearance by Per C. Vaage on behalf of Phillippe J. Bolduc (Vaage, Per) (DaSilva, Carolina).
February 14, 2018 Filing 665 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Sarli on behalf of Phillippe J. Bolduc (Sarli, Michael)
February 14, 2018 Filing 664 NOTICE of Appearance by Per C. Vaage on behalf of Phillippe J. Bolduc (Vaage, Per)
February 14, 2018 Filing 663 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Phillippe J. Bolduc (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-cv-10241-IT, filed by Phillippe J. Bolduc.(Vaage, Per) Modified member case number on 2/15/2018 (DaSilva, Carolina).
February 13, 2018 Filing 662 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #661 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
February 12, 2018 Filing 661 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Douglas A. Dellaccio Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7006664 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
February 12, 2018 Filing 660 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-10007-IT, filed by Kenneth Davison.(Fitzgerald, Kevin)
February 9, 2018 Filing 659 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Klenofsky on behalf of Christopher Hayes, Crystal Hayes (Klenofsky, Joseph)
February 9, 2018 Filing 658 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #657 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Craig Rosenbaum. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
February 8, 2018 Filing 657 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Craig Rosenbaum Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7001262 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
February 7, 2018 Filing 656 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #652 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Bobby Saadian. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
February 6, 2018 Filing 655 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-10229, filed by Samuel Bumpus.(Leonoudakis, Ross)
February 6, 2018 Filing 654 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Gallant on behalf of Janice O'Hare, Robert O'Hare (Gallant, Michael)
February 6, 2018 Filing 653 Conditional Transfer order number 27 in MDL 2768 dated 2/6/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
February 6, 2018 Filing 652 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Bobby Saadian Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6995782 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
February 5, 2018 Filing 651 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey S. Meyerkord on behalf of Christopher Hayes, Crystal Hayes (Meyerkord, Geoffrey)
February 5, 2018 Filing 650 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Steward on behalf of Crystal Hayes, Christopher Hayes (Steward, John)
February 2, 2018 Filing 649 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Modl, Michael) Relates to 18-cv-10193 Rodger W. Stampfli (DaSilva, Carolina).
February 2, 2018 Filing 648 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-cv-10193, filed by Rodger W. Stampfli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Modl, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 647 NOTICE of Appearance by Gail C. Groy on behalf of Rodger W. Stampfli (Groy, Gail)
February 2, 2018 Filing 646 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Modl on behalf of Rodger W. Stampfli (Modl, Michael)
February 2, 2018 Filing 645 Conditional Transfer order in MDL 2768 dated 2/1/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
February 1, 2018 Filing 644 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Sabourin on behalf of Joseph Brett (Sabourin, Andrew)
January 31, 2018 Filing 643 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER TERMINATING CIVIL ACTIONS: 17-cv-10903; 17-cv-11813; 17-cv-11950 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-10903-IT, 1:17-cv-11813-IT, 1:17-cv-11950-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
January 30, 2018 Filing 642 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant's Proposed Substantive Restrictions on Plaintiff Counsel's Communications with Plaintiffs' Treating Physician (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 30, 2018 Filing 641 NOTICE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. of Memorandum in Support of Proposal to Limit Ex Parte Communications with Implanting and Treating Physicians (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ferrera, David)
January 30, 2018 Filing 640 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 30, 2018 Filing 639 Transcript of Telephone Conference held on January 23, 2018, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 2/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 30, 2018 Filing 638 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #636 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Gail C. Groy; ALLOWING #637 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael J. Modl. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 30, 2018 Filing 637 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael J. Modl Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6985482 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 30, 2018 Filing 636 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gail Groy Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6985481 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 26, 2018 Filing 635 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 26, 2018 Filing 634 Transcript of Status Conference held on January 16, 2018, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 2/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 26, 2018 Filing 633 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Allison on behalf of Pamela C. Quinn (Allison, John)
January 25, 2018 Filing 632 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #631 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Victor C. Harding. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 24, 2018 Filing 631 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Victor Harding Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6978959 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 24, 2018 Filing 630 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Hogins on behalf of Brenda Butler, Edward Butler (Hogins, Jonathan)
January 24, 2018 Filing 629 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. AMENDED Case Management Order No. 4 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
January 23, 2018 Filing 628 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Telephone Conference held on 1/23/2018. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. Parties agree as follows: date by which plaintiffs must serve substantially completed Plaintiffs' Fact Sheets, for purposes of eligibility for selection into Initial Bellwether Discovery Pool (see Section A.2 of Case Management Order No. 4), extended from January 12, 2018, to January 26, 2018. Deadline for each side to select cases for inclusion into Initial Bellwether Discovery Pool extended from February 7, 2018, to February 14, 2018. Amended Case Management Order No. 4 to follow. Parties advised to request telephone conference if further issues arise. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Flowers, Pete; McGlamry, Mike; Raso, Ashleigh; Relkin, Ellen; Catullo, Kim; Curry, Dawn; Ferrera, David; Tedder, Gay) (MacDonald, Gail)
January 23, 2018 Filing 626 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #625 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jonathan A. Hogins. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 22, 2018 Filing 625 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jonathan Hogins Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6973544 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 22, 2018 Filing 623 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #619 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John D. Allison; ALLOWING #620 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Geoffrey S. Meyerkord. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 19, 2018 Filing 622 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Corrected Case Management Order No. 5 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
January 19, 2018 Filing 621 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. AMENDED MDL Order No. 1 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
January 19, 2018 Filing 620 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Geoffrey S. Meyerkord Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6970782 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 19, 2018 Filing 619 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Allison Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6970748 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 19, 2018 Filing 618 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-10103-IT, filed by Jackie L. Crimm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Relkin, Ellen)
January 19, 2018 Filing 617 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 1/23/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 18, 2018 Filing 616 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #608 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael E. Gallant. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 17, 2018 Filing 627 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Case Management Conference held on 1/17/2018. Case called. Judge Rachelle L. Harz (Sup. Ct. NJ) joins Judge Talwani on the bench. Proceedings limited to attorneys of record. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Beil, Fitzgerald, Fleishman, Moody, Nemo, Schafle, Shems, Slater, Toomajian, Weintraub, Williams, Peterson, Flowers, Warner, Raso, Relkin, McGlamry, Kelley, Blakely, Gallant (pending pro hac), McDonough, Courson, Gardner, Rojas, Ayala, Lee, Szerlag, Williams, Apjohn, Wadhwani, Catullo, Ferrera, Deutsch, Tedder (pending pro hac).) (MacDonald, Gail)
January 17, 2018 Filing 615 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Emison on behalf of Nancy Hubbard, Randy Hubbard (Emison, Brett)
January 17, 2018 Filing 614 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia L. Campbell on behalf of Nancy Hubbard, Randy Hubbard (Campbell, Patricia)
January 17, 2018 Filing 613 DUPLICATE FILING. See #46 Notice (Catullo, Kim) (DaSilva, Carolina).
January 17, 2018 Filing 612 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Hendricks on behalf of Gladys Layne, Russell Layne (Hendricks, Sean)
January 17, 2018 Filing 611 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12549, filed by Randy Hubbard, Nancy Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Emison, Brett)
January 16, 2018 Filing 624 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 1/16/2018. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. Start date for specified depositions 5/15/18. Additional briefing due in two weeks, by 1/30/18. Bellwether selection deadline extended to 2/7/18; telephone conference set for 10AM Tues., 1/22/18. Parties to confer in re: to deficiency and alert the clerk if a hearing is needed. Next Status Conference set for 3/2/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Kelley, Flowers, Williams, Deutsch, Catullo, Apjohn, Raso, Blekely, McGlamry, Relkin, Fitzgerald, Lee, Leonoudakis, Schafle, Shems, Robinson, Slater, Toomajian, Ward, Weintraub) (MacDonald, Gail)
January 16, 2018 Filing 610 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachal G. Rojas on behalf of John Vander Sanden (Rojas, Rachal) (Main Document 610 replaced on 1/19/2018 to correct caption ) (DaSilva, Carolina). Relates to Member Case: 18-cv-10014
January 16, 2018 Filing 609 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Nigh on behalf of Randall Alex (Nigh, Daniel)
January 16, 2018 Filing 608 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mike Gallant Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6964806 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 15, 2018 Filing 607 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-10075-IT, filed by Holly Ann Elkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Relkin, Ellen)
January 15, 2018 Filing 606 NOTICE of Appearance by Willard James Moody, Jr on behalf of EDWARD BUTLER, BRENDA BUTLER (Moody, Willard)
January 15, 2018 Filing 605 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:18-cv-10073, filed by EDWARD BUTLER, BRENDA BUTLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moody, Willard)
January 15, 2018 Filing 604 NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Status Conference set for 11:00 AM on 1/16/2018 is RESET for 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. PLEASE NOTE CHANGE IN TIME ONLY. (MacDonald, Gail)
January 12, 2018 Filing 603 NOTICE FILED USING INCORRECT ACCOUNT . See #610 Notice
January 12, 2018 Filing 602 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew K Gardner on behalf of John Vander Sanden (Gardner, Andrew ) (Main Document 602 replaced on 1/19/2018 to correct caption ) (DaSilva, Carolina).
January 12, 2018 Filing 601 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-cv-10070, filed by Jacqueline Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnston, Jason)
January 12, 2018 Filing 600 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-cv-10067, filed by Gerald Churray, Donna Churray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnston, Jason)
January 12, 2018 Filing 599 NOTICE of Appearance by Navan Ward, Jr on behalf of Joseph Brett (Ward, Navan)
January 12, 2018 Filing 598 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-12357, filed by Mark Irving.(Fitzgerald, Kevin)
January 11, 2018 Filing 597 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel re #3 Order Joint Proposed Amended MDL Order 1 (Raso, Ashleigh)
January 11, 2018 Filing 596 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 5 (Deposition Guidelines). (MacDonald, Gail)
January 10, 2018 Filing 595 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Elizabeth Littell Courson on behalf of Joseph Brett (Courson, C. Elizabeth)
January 10, 2018 Filing 594 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Larry R. Patterson, Susan B. Patterson (Warriner, C.)
January 10, 2018 Filing 593 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp, Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-10052, filed by Larry R. Patterson, Susan B. Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warriner, C.)
January 9, 2018 Filing 592 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Document received: Proposed Agenda for January 16, 2018 MDL Case Management Conference. (Deutsch, Nicholas)
January 9, 2018 Filing 591 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica S. Williams on behalf of Leonard Armand, Paul Loizzo (Williams, Jessica)
January 9, 2018 Filing 590 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #588 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John S. Steward; ALLOWING #589 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joseph D. Klenofsky. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 8, 2018 Filing 589 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph Klenofsky Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6954208 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 8, 2018 Filing 588 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Steward Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6954200 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 8, 2018 Filing 587 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #583 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jessica S. Williams; ALLOWING #584 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sean Hendricks. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 5, 2018 Filing 586 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 5, 2018 Filing 585 Transcript of Status Conference held on December 21, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 1/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
January 4, 2018 Filing 584 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sean Hendricks Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6950378 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 4, 2018 Filing 583 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jessica Williams Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6950349 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
January 4, 2018 Filing 582 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 18-cv-10022, filed by Jonathan Sellers, Rachel Sellers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeGaris, Annesley)
January 3, 2018 Filing 581 NOTICE of Appearance by James Robert Bell, III on behalf of Joseph Abbanato, Barry Day, Lawrence Diedrich, Linda Diedrich, Richard Fredette, Daryl Gerber, Charles Edward Haack, David L Johnson, Joseph Kotulka, Charles Melle, Arne Oyre, Yanique Oyre, Paul Pfeufer, Edward Rearick, Karen Rearick, Amy Saunders, David T. Stewart, Judith Venegoni, Eugene Willard (Bell, James)
January 3, 2018 Filing 580 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed S. Diab on behalf of Leonard Armand, Paul Loizzo (Diab, Ahmed)
January 3, 2018 Filing 579 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CINDY HOWARD (FARNOLO, NICHOLAS) Member case 17-cv-10903 closed on 11/14/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
January 3, 2018 Filing 578 Conditional Transfer order number 26 in MDL 2768 dated 1/3/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
January 3, 2018 Filing 577 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 1/16/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
January 2, 2018 Filing 576 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria S Diamond on behalf of Robert Hanson (Diamond, Maria) Relates to 17-cv-12552-IT (DaSilva, Carolina).
January 2, 2018 Filing 575 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against Robert Hanson Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6947254 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Robert Hanson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category FOrm)(Diamond, Maria) Relates to 17-cv-12552-IT (DaSilva, Carolina). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/3/2018 due to fillable format ) (DaSilva, Carolina).
December 29, 2017 Filing 574 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12574, filed by Patricia Rendle, George Rendle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Walter)
December 27, 2017 Filing 573 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12562, filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp, Randall Alex. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nigh, Daniel)
December 27, 2017 Filing 572 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Fitzgerald on behalf of MARK IRVING (Fitzgerald, Kevin) (Main Document 572 replaced on 12/28/2017 due to fillable format ) (DaSilva, Carolina).
December 27, 2017 Filing 571 Conditional Transfer order FINALIZED. number 25 in MDL 2768 dated 12/27/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
December 27, 2017 Filing 570 NOTICE from the MDL Panel, ORDER REVOKING FINAL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER re #568 MDL Transfer Order No. 25. (Jones, Sherry)
December 26, 2017 Filing 569 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Master Long Form Complaint Doc 373 filed 10/27/2017 by Howmedica Osteonics Corp..(Williams, Gene)
December 26, 2017 Filing 568 Conditional Transfer order number 25 in MDL 2768 dated 12/26/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
December 22, 2017 Filing 567 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-12546, filed by Tacsonia Baudoin, Keith Baudoin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Walter)
December 22, 2017 Filing 566 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-12545, filed by Amy Leyva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Walter)
December 21, 2017 Filing 565 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12538, filed by Michael Squicciarini, Tina Squicciarini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnston, Jason)
December 21, 2017 Filing 564 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12536, filed by John Bortoli, Anna Marie Bortoli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnston, Jason) Modified member case number on 12/22/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
December 21, 2017 Filing 563 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Telephone Conference held on 12/21/2017. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel on discovery issue. Science Day Hearing set for 1/17/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Status conference to be set by clerk. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Arevalo, Kristy; Blakely, M.J.; DeGaris, Annesley; Flowers, Pete; Johnston, Jason; Kelley, Walter; McDonough, Brendan; Breann, Plasters; Raso, Ashleigh; Relkin, Ellen; Asfendis, Paul; Deutsch, Nicholas; Ferrera, David) (MacDonald, Gail)
December 21, 2017 Filing 562 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Toomajian III on behalf of Debbie Brown, Dennis Brown (Toomajian III, Charles)
December 21, 2017 Filing 561 NOTICE of Appearance by Christin DiMartino on behalf of Dick Darling (DiMartino, Christin)
December 21, 2017 Filing 560 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-12525, filed by Dick Darling, Susan Darling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiMartino, Christin)
December 20, 2017 Filing 559 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross E. Leonoudakis on behalf of Allan R Gribben, Helen Gribben (Leonoudakis, Ross)
December 20, 2017 Filing 558 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Asfendis on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Asfendis, Paul)
December 20, 2017 Filing 557 NOTICE of Appearance by Shayna Slater on behalf of Curtis Hicks, Jane Hicks (Slater, Shayna)
December 20, 2017 Filing 556 NOTICE of Appearance by Shayna Slater on behalf of Robert Andrukaitis (Slater, Shayna)
December 20, 2017 Filing 555 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #552 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Patricia L. Campbell; ALLOWING #553 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brett A. Emison. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
December 19, 2017 Filing 554 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12510, filed by Allan R Gribben, Helen Gribben. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leonoudakis, Ross)
December 19, 2017 Filing 553 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brett Emison Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6935284 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
December 19, 2017 Filing 552 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Patricia Campbell Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6935283 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
December 19, 2017 Filing 551 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 12/21/2017 01:30 PM EST in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel appearing telephonically are instructed to call 888-808-6929 and enter code 8523158# five minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. (MacDonald, Gail)
December 18, 2017 Filing 550 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Kathy Cadavid, Luis Cadavid (Warriner, C.)
December 18, 2017 Filing 549 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12484-IT, filed by Luis Cadavid, Kathy Cadavid. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warriner, C.)
December 18, 2017 Filing 548 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The Telephone Conference set for 12/21/2017 is canceled. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
December 15, 2017 Filing 547 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Beth Ann Bark (DiCello, Mark) Member case 17-cv-12119 closed on 12/14/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
December 14, 2017 Filing 546 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Phyllis Kerr. (Nigh, Daniel) Member Case 17-cv-11813 closed on 12/18/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
December 14, 2017 Filing 545 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 12/21/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
December 12, 2017 Filing 544 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark M. Abramowitz on behalf of F. Michael Apicella (Abramowitz, Mark)
December 12, 2017 Filing 543 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12438, filed by F. Michael Apicella. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abramowitz, Mark)
December 12, 2017 Filing 542 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12449, filed by Jeanette Zavota. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Walter)
December 11, 2017 Filing 541 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12437-IT, filed by Sumpter Barker, Donna Barker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schlueter, Richard)
December 11, 2017 Filing 540 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12436, filed by Michael Pallos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Walter)
December 11, 2017 Filing 539 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12434-IT, filed by Nancy Soper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet & Category Form)(Szerlag, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/12/2017 due to fillable format ) (DaSilva, Carolina).
December 11, 2017 Filing 538 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12435, filed by Peter Antinopoulos, Tamara A. Bauer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Walter)
December 11, 2017 Filing 537 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12431, filed by Dennis Hinz, Jill Hinz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Walter)
December 11, 2017 Filing 536 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12429-IT, filed by Charles E. Gibson, Claire Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schlueter, Richard)
December 11, 2017 Filing 535 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Larry Hamilton (Payne, Andrew) Member case 17-cv-11950 closed on 12/12/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
December 11, 2017 Filing 534 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #530 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ross E. Leonoudakis. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
December 11, 2017 Filing 533 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2017 Filing 532 Transcript of Status Conference held on November 30, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com Redaction Request due 1/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 8, 2017 Filing 531 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Case Management Order No. 4 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
December 8, 2017 Filing 530 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ross Leonoudakis Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6920962 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
December 7, 2017 Filing 529 COMPLAINT against James Wischnewski (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12407-IT, filed by James Wischnewski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Szerlag, David)(Attachment 2 replaced on 12/8/2017 due to fillable format) (DaSilva, Carolina).
December 7, 2017 Filing 528 COMPLAINT against Jean Westerlund (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12406-IT, filed by Jean Westerlund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Szerlag, David) (Main Document 528, Attachment 1 and 2 replaced on 12/8/2017 to correct the short form complaint to the appropriate plaintiff ) (DaSilva, Carolina).
December 7, 2017 Filing 527 COMPLAINT against Scott Shields (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12405-IT, filed by Scott Shields. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Szerlag, David) (Main Document 527, Attachment 1 and 2, replaced on 12/8/2017 to correct the short form complaint to the appropriate plaintiff ) (DaSilva, Carolina).
December 7, 2017 Filing 526 COMPLAINT against Dorothy Baier (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12404-IT, filed by Dorothy Baier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Szerlag, David) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/8/2017 due to fillable format) (DaSilva, Carolina).
December 7, 2017 Filing 525 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12413, filed by Jane Hicks, Curtis Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anapol, Thomas)
December 7, 2017 Filing 524 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Abraham Fakhoury on behalf of Edwin R. Brown, Joann Brown (Fakhoury, Michael)
December 7, 2017 Filing 523 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-md-2768, filed by Edwin R. Brown, Joann Brown.(Fakhoury, Michael)
December 6, 2017 Filing 522 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel re #513 Notice (Other) Joint Submission Regarding Parties' Position on Proposed Case Management Order Governing the Bellwether Selection and Trial Process (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Raso, Ashleigh)
December 6, 2017 Filing 521 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12408, filed by Joseph Mautino, Katherine Mautino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fishman, Craig)
December 6, 2017 Filing 520 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #518 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Todd H. Ramsey; ALLOWING #519 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Shayna Slater. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
December 5, 2017 Filing 519 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Shayna Slater Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6915344 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
December 5, 2017 Filing 518 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Todd Ramsey Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6915309 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh) (Main Document 518 & Attachment 1 replaced on 12/6/2017 to correct filling error) (DaSilva, Carolina).
December 5, 2017 Filing 517 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The Telephone Conference set for 12/07/2017 is canceled. Counsel shall instead file a short, joint position paper that sets forth the reasons for the respective proposals. Proposal due by midnight on Wednesday 12/6/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
December 5, 2017 Filing 515 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #514 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Charles R. Toomajian III. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
December 4, 2017 Filing 514 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Charles Toomajian Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6911989 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
December 1, 2017 Filing 513 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel Joint Proposed Order Governing Bellwether Protocol (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 30, 2017 Filing 516 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 11/30/2017. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. Counsel shall submit proposed plan re: docketing. Counsel to submit proposals in re: to hearing to be held with Judge Harz. The court shall hold the week of 1/16/17 open. The hearing shall be set for two days and shall include a status conference. Telephone Conference re: bellwether case set for 12/7/2017 03:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani., Telephone Conference re: discovery set for 12/21/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Anapol, Arevalo, Ayala, Bell, Blakely, DiCello, Fleishman, Johnston, Kershaw, McDonough, McGlamry, Moody, Robinson, Schafle, Schlueter, Warriner, Flowers, Kelley, Relkin, Raso, DeGaris, Hubbard, Williams, Deutch, Catulo, Apjohn, Curry, Wadhwani) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
November 30, 2017 Filing 512 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #511 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added James Robert Bell, III. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 29, 2017 Filing 511 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James Robert Bell, III, Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6905561 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 29, 2017 Filing 510 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #494 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; ALLOWING #496 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; ALLOWING #498 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Added Craig Fishman, Breann Plasters & Paul Hart. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 28, 2017 Filing 509 Conditional Transfer order number 24 in MDL 2768 dated 11/28/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
November 27, 2017 Filing 508 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-10842, filed by Henry C. Rayburn.(Saunders, Joseph)
November 27, 2017 Filing 507 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12336, filed by JOHN GRUVER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sullivan, Kevin)
November 27, 2017 Filing 506 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Kameron Pillow (Warriner, C.)
November 27, 2017 Filing 505 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-12325, filed by Kameron Pillow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warriner, C.)
November 26, 2017 Filing 504 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel Proposed Agenda for the November 30, 2017 Status Conference (Raso, Ashleigh)
November 22, 2017 Filing 503 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12320, filed by Elliot Goldman, Lisa Goldman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kershaw, William)
November 21, 2017 Filing 502 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-10913, filed by Francis T. Hassett.(Saunders, Joseph)
November 21, 2017 Filing 501 NOTICE by Administrative Counsel re #500 Notice (Other), #499 Notice (Other) of Position Paper in Support of Proposed CMO Governing Deposition Guidelines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Plaintiff's Proposed CMO Regarding Deposition Protocol)(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 21, 2017 Filing 500 NOTICE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. of Position Paper in Support of Proposed CMO Governing Deposition Guidelines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Deutsch, Nicholas)
November 21, 2017 Filing 499 NOTICE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. of Proposed Joint Submission of Case Management Order Governing Deposition Guidelines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Deutsch, Nicholas)
November 21, 2017 Filing 498 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul Hart Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6896348 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 21, 2017 Filing 497 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered in case 1:16-cv-11510-IT; granting (495) Motion for Extension of Time in regards to Deposition Protocol in case 1:17-md-02768-IT Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
November 20, 2017 Filing 496 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Breann Plasters Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6895718 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 20, 2017 Filing 495 MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/21/17 to File Proposed Deposition Protocol by Administrative Counsel.(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 20, 2017 Filing 494 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Craig Fishman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6894134 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 17, 2017 Filing 493 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #492 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christin DiMartino. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 16, 2017 Filing 492 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christin DiMartino Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6890574 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 16, 2017 Filing 491 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Alice Grist (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12271, filed by Alice Grist. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 15, 2017 Filing 490 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 15, 2017 Filing 489 Transcript of Teleconference held on November 9, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 12/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 15, 2017 Filing 488 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #483 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; ALLOWING #487 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brendan McDonough & Kevin P. Sullivan Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 14, 2017 Filing 487 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kevin Sullivan Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6886209 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 14, 2017 Filing 486 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL C. SCHAFLE on behalf of Amy Saunders (SCHAFLE, MICHAEL)
November 14, 2017 Filing 485 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12242, filed by Arne Oyre, Yanique Oyre.(Osborne, Joseph)
November 14, 2017 Filing 484 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12241, filed by Amy Saunders.(Osborne, Joseph)
November 14, 2017 Filing 483 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brendan McDonough Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6885640 by Administrative Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Certificate of Good Standing)(Raso, Ashleigh)
November 14, 2017 Filing 482 COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11501, filed by Phyllis W Hammersley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Davis, Alex)
November 13, 2017 Filing 480 COMPLAINT Joseph Abbanato, Karen Abbanato against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12207, filed by Joseph Abbanato.(Osborne, Joseph)
November 13, 2017 Filing 479 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. FACT SHEET IMPLEMENTATION ORDER (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #2 Defendant Fact Sheet)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
November 13, 2017 Filing 478 COMPLAINT Joan Ross against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12236, filed by Joan Ross.(Flowers, Peter)
November 10, 2017 Filing 477 COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17cv10904, filed by ALMA CARMICHAEL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet for Short Form Complaint)(FARNOLO, NICHOLAS)
November 10, 2017 Filing 476 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12001, filed by Minnie S Woods.(Davis, Alex)
November 10, 2017 Filing 475 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-12160, filed by James A Zittel.(Davis, Alex)
November 10, 2017 Filing 474 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12094, filed by Phillip D Simmons.(Davis, Alex)
November 10, 2017 Filing 473 DUPLICATE FILING See #482 Short Form Complaint (DaSilva, Carolina).
November 10, 2017 Filing 472 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10918-IT, filed by Joseph Brett, Helena Brett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woodson, Frank) (Main Document 472 replaced on 11/14/2017 with corrected document caption)( modified text) (DaSilva, Carolina).
November 10, 2017 Filing 471 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11183-IT, filed by Karla Smoot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet For Short Form Complaint)(DiCello, Mark) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/14/2017 due to fillable format) (DaSilva, Carolina).
November 10, 2017 Filing 470 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. DiCello on behalf of Karla Smoot (DiCello, Mark)
November 10, 2017 Filing 469 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10984, filed by Aaron Powell.(Dougherty, Kimberly)
November 10, 2017 Filing 468 COMPLAINT Short Form against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11862, filed by Donald Ray Lovell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(Devine, Brian)
November 10, 2017 Filing 467 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:2017-cv-12079-IT, filed by Carol B. Weis.(DeGaris, Annesley)
November 10, 2017 Filing 466 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:2017-cv-10696-IT, filed by Rosanne Gmuer.(DeGaris, Annesley)
November 10, 2017 Filing 465 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12109-IT, filed by SUSAN LUSH.(Pittner, Laura)(Main Document 465 replaced on 11/14/2017 with corrected document caption) (DaSilva, Carolina).
November 10, 2017 Filing 464 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura L Pittner on behalf of SUSAN LUSH (Pittner, Laura) (Main Document 464 replaced on 11/14/2017 with corrected document caption) (DaSilva, Carolina).
November 10, 2017 Filing 463 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 16-cv-11510, filed by Robert O'Hare.(Kelley, Walter)
November 10, 2017 Filing 462 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10411, filed by Christine McCooe.(Kelley, Walter)
November 10, 2017 Filing 461 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10815, filed by Richard Fredette.(Kelley, Walter)
November 10, 2017 Filing 460 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10287-IT, filed by Linda Regan.(Kelley, Walter)
November 9, 2017 Filing 481 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Telephone Conference held on 11/9/2017. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel re: the Proposed Fact Sheet/Implementation Order. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Blakely, Flowers, Raso, Schlueter, Walter Fleicshman, Ashley, Apjohn, Weintraub, Catullo, Deutsch, Williams) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
November 9, 2017 Filing 459 COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12222, filed by Irma Atienzo, Rodolfo Magallanes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ayala, Thomas)
November 9, 2017 Filing 458 COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11100, filed by Beverly Landis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ayala, Thomas)
November 9, 2017 Filing 457 COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11102, filed by Robert Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ayala, Thomas)
November 9, 2017 Filing 456 NOTICE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Filing of Fact Sheet Implementation Order and Fact Sheets (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Deutsch, Nicholas)
November 9, 2017 Filing 455 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12086-IT, filed by Lois Kolbosky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Beil, Julianne) (Attachment 1, 2, and 3 replaced on 11/14/2017 due to fillable format) (DaSilva, Carolina).
November 9, 2017 Filing 454 STATUS REPORT Update Re Deposition Guidelines by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Deutsch, Nicholas)
November 9, 2017 Filing 453 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10677, filed by Carol Keller, Daniel Keller.(Zimmerman, Genevieve)
November 9, 2017 Filing 452 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10899, filed by David Campbell, Glenda Campbell.(Mann, Jonathan)
November 9, 2017 Filing 451 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10715, filed by Mary Jean Pitts.(Zimmerman, Genevieve)
November 9, 2017 Filing 450 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11942, filed by Anthony Paciolla, Jamie Paciolla.(Talley, Stuart)
November 9, 2017 Filing 449 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10057, filed by Joseph Driscoll.(Talley, Stuart)
November 9, 2017 Filing 448 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:16-cv-12253, filed by William D'Orlando.(Talley, Stuart)
November 9, 2017 Filing 447 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11002, filed by Sally Serrago.(Talley, Stuart)
November 9, 2017 Filing 446 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10960, filed by Eleanor Zimny.(Talley, Stuart)
November 9, 2017 Filing 445 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10940, filed by Donald E. Rodgers.(Talley, Stuart)
November 9, 2017 Filing 444 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10933, filed by Rolande Baker.(Talley, Stuart)
November 8, 2017 Filing 443 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11001, filed by Sara Thompson.(Talley, Stuart)
November 8, 2017 Filing 442 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-11805, filed by Niels Foster.(Johnston, Jason)
November 8, 2017 Filing 441 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-11804, filed by Amy Davidson.(Johnston, Jason)
November 8, 2017 Filing 440 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-10816, filed by Leo Boutiette.(Johnston, Jason)
November 8, 2017 Filing 439 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-11106, filed by Kenton Beachy.(Johnston, Jason)
November 8, 2017 Filing 438 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-11125, filed by Camilla Pakela, Robert Pakela.(Johnston, Jason)
November 8, 2017 Filing 437 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-10683, filed by Debbie Brown, Dennis Brown.(Johnston, Jason)
November 8, 2017 Filing 436 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-11000, filed by Janet Noennig, John Noennig.(Johnston, Jason)
November 8, 2017 Filing 435 NOTICE by Lawrence Diedrich, Linda Diedrich of Short Form Complaint (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(Seithel, Lynn)
November 7, 2017 Filing 434 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10606-IT, filed by Donald Belisle.(Pittner, Laura)
November 7, 2017 Filing 433 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura L Pittner on behalf of Donald Belisle (Pittner, Laura)
November 7, 2017 Filing 432 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11262-IT, filed by Pamela Keller.(Flowers, Peter)
November 7, 2017 Filing 431 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10605, filed by Gladys Layne, Russell Layne.(Flowers, Peter)
November 7, 2017 Filing 430 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11516-IT, filed by Larry R. Schneider.(Dolejsi, Holly)
November 7, 2017 Filing 429 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11788-IT, filed by Marc Ledoux.(Flowers, Peter)
November 7, 2017 Filing 428 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-11272, filed by Wendall Yaeger, Janet Yaeger.(Flowers, Peter)
November 7, 2017 Filing 427 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10673-IT, filed by Leanne Halfman.(Flowers, Peter)
November 7, 2017 Filing 426 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11264-IT, filed by Russell Tincher.(Flowers, Peter)
November 7, 2017 Filing 425 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Devine on behalf of Donald Ray Lovell (Devine, Brian)
November 7, 2017 Filing 424 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Osborne on behalf of Daryl Gerber, Edward Rearick, Karen Rearick, Judith Venegoni (Osborne, Joseph)
November 7, 2017 Filing 423 Judge Indira Talwani: ENDORSED ORDER entered re: (369) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:17-md-02768-IT; (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:17-cv-11862-IT. " Denied as moot in light of approved substitution of attorney." Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-11862-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
November 7, 2017 Filing 422 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-11862-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
November 7, 2017 Filing 421 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R. Schlueter on behalf of Linda Land (Schlueter, Richard)
November 7, 2017 Filing 420 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17:cv-10939-IT, filed by Linda Land. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schlueter, Richard)
November 7, 2017 Filing 419 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 3:17-cv-10162, filed by Jane Provenzano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gogel, Kenneth)
November 7, 2017 Filing 418 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL C. SCHAFLE on behalf of Edward Rearick, Karen Rearick (SCHAFLE, MICHAEL)
November 7, 2017 Filing 417 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-12169-IT, filed by Karen Rearick, Edward Rearick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Category Sheet)(SCHAFLE, MICHAEL)
November 7, 2017 Filing 416 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 11/9/2017 12:00 PM before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel shall call 617-804-0835 to be connected to the conference center. (MacDonald, Gail)
November 6, 2017 Filing 415 Consent MOTION for Order to Granting Substitution of Attorney by Donald Ray Lovell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Devine, Brian)
November 6, 2017 Filing 414 Letter/request (non-motion) from Nicholas N. Deutsch Concerning Court's Instructions re PFS. (Deutsch, Nicholas)
November 4, 2017 Filing 413 COMPLAINT against Bernard Hoare (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11184-IT, filed by Bernard Hoare.(Krull, Gregory)
November 4, 2017 Filing 412 COMPLAINT against Susan Adelman (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11499, filed by Susan Adelman.(Krull, Gregory)
November 3, 2017 Filing 410 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11124, filed by Joseph Kotulka. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHAFLE, MICHAEL)
November 3, 2017 Filing 409 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 17-cv-11103-it, filed by David L Johnson, Paula Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHAFLE, MICHAEL)
November 2, 2017 Filing 411 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered ALLOWING #408 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 6, 2017 to File Proposed Modifications to Fact Sheet Implementation Order and/or Plaintiff Fact Sheet. (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 2, 2017 Filing 408 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 6, 2017 to File Proposed Modifications to Fact Sheet Implementation Order and/or Plaintiff Fact Sheet by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deutsch, Nicholas)
November 2, 2017 Filing 407 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-10691, filed by Robert Andrukaitis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anapol, Thomas)
November 2, 2017 Filing 406 NOTICE by David T. Stewart Short Form Complaint (Osborne, Joseph)
November 2, 2017 Filing 405 NOTICE by Charles Edward Haack Short Form Complaint (Osborne, Joseph)
November 2, 2017 Filing 404 NOTICE by Paul Pfeufer Short Form Complaint (Osborne, Joseph)
November 2, 2017 Filing 403 NOTICE by Barry Day Short Form Complaint (Osborne, Joseph)
November 2, 2017 Filing 402 NOTICE by Eugene Willard Short Form Complaint (Osborne, Joseph)
November 1, 2017 Filing 401 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11950, filed by Larry Hamilton.(Payne, Andrew)
November 1, 2017 Filing 400 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document 397 corrected because: it was filed in error. (MacDonald, Gail)
October 31, 2017 Filing 399 COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 3:17-cv-30056, filed by Diane M. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ayala, Thomas)
October 31, 2017 Filing 398 COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:17-cv-11055, filed by Bob Kareis, Dorothy Kareis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ayala, Thomas)
October 31, 2017 Filing 397 THIS DOCUMENT WAS FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Deutsch, Nicholas) Modified on 11/1/2017, to include error message (MacDonald, Gail).
October 31, 2017 Filing 396 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Coffin on behalf of Jimmy Gordon (Coffin, Christopher)
October 31, 2017 Filing 395 NOTICE by Jimmy Gordon of Short Form Complaint Filed in case 1:17-cv-12127 (Coffin, Christopher)
October 31, 2017 Filing 394 NOTICE by Betty Shuman Short Form Complaint in Case No. 17-cv-11104-IT (Osteen, James) Modified text to include member case on 11/2/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 31, 2017 Filing 393 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Sandy Back. Acknowledgement filed by Sandy Back. (Relkin, Ellen)
October 31, 2017 Filing 392 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Eric C. Stevens, Sofia Stevens (Relkin, Ellen)
October 31, 2017 Filing 391 NOTICE by Eric C. Stevens, Sofia Stevens SHORT FORM COMPLAINT in Case No. 17-cv-12068-IT (Relkin, Ellen) Modified text on 11/2/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 31, 2017 Filing 390 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Sandy Back (Relkin, Ellen)
October 31, 2017 Filing 389 NOTICE by Sandy Back (Short Form Complaint in Case No. 17-cv-12069-IT) (Relkin, Ellen)
October 30, 2017 Filing 388 NOTICE by Betty S. Sadler Short Form Complaint in case 17-cv-10681-IT (Raso, Ashleigh)
October 30, 2017 Filing 387 NOTICE by Jane Schires, Michael Schires Short Form Complaint in case 17-cv-11287-IT (Raso, Ashleigh)
October 30, 2017 Filing 386 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Elizabeth Raso on behalf of Jane Schires, Michael Schires (Raso, Ashleigh)
October 30, 2017 Filing 385 NOTICE by Deborah Denne, LeRoy Denne Short Form Complaint in case 17-cv-10713-IT (Raso, Ashleigh)
October 30, 2017 Filing 384 NOTICE by Patton Witt Short Form Complaint in case 1:17-cv-10713-IT (Raso, Ashleigh)
October 30, 2017 Filing 383 NOTICE by Daniel Smeins Short Form Complaint in case 17-cv-10714-IT (Raso, Ashleigh) (Main Document 383 replaced on 10/31/2017 to correct document caption) (DaSilva, Carolina). Modified text on 10/31/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 30, 2017 Filing 382 NOTICE by Connie Lou Dowzak, Steven Dowzak Short Form Complaint in case 1:17-cv-10951-IT (Raso, Ashleigh)
October 30, 2017 Filing 381 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Elizabeth Raso on behalf of Steven Dowzak, Connie Lou Dowzak (Raso, Ashleigh)
October 30, 2017 Filing 380 NOTICE by Kathrine Bryniarski Short Form Complaint in case 1:17-cv-11612 (Raso, Ashleigh)
October 30, 2017 Filing 379 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Elizabeth Raso on behalf of Kathrine Bryniarski (Raso, Ashleigh) (Main Document 379 replaced on 10/31/2017 to correct document caption ) (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 30, 2017 Filing 378 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 30, 2017 Filing 377 Transcript of Case Management Conference and Product Demonstration held on October 26, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 11/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 28, 2017 Filing 376 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/23/2017., filed by Beth Ann Bark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiCello, Mark) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/31/2017 due to fillable format) (DaSilva, Carolina). Relates to 17-cv-12119-IT
October 28, 2017 Filing 375 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. DiCello on behalf of Beth Ann Bark (DiCello, Mark)
October 27, 2017 Filing 373 MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (DaSilva, Carolina)
October 27, 2017 Filing 372 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: (369) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Clinton L. Kelly is directed to confer with Defendants' counsel as to the proposed extension of deadlines set forth in paragraph 2 of Counsel's Motion to Withdraw (17-md-2768 [#369], 17-cv-11862 [#23]) and to file an appropriate Local Rule 7.1 Certificate advising the court as to whether Defendants' counsel assents-to or opposes the requested relief. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-11862-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
October 26, 2017 Filing 374 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 10/26/2017. Case called. The Honorable Judge Rachelle Harz, Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, participates by videoteleconference for the product portion of the conference. Counsel present their products. Judge Harz signs off. Court continues with case management conference agenda. Future cases to be filed first as a new civil case and shall pay the filing fee. Once the new case is filed, a short form complaint shall be filed in the Master MDL. Until ecf events are changed, counsel may select the Notices event and choosing Notice Other, and attach the short form complaint as an exhibit. The fee waiver language shall not be used. The clerk will proceed to file the proposed Master Complaint to avoid a second fee request on ecf. Pro hac vice filing procedures. The court will review whether payment of pro hac vice fees after such motions are granted should be permitted to avoid any unnecessary delay. Rule 26(f) order did not include deposition scheduling. Parties to meet and confer and report back to the court by 11/9/17. Proposed Modifications to the Fact Sheet Implementation Order and/or Plaintiffs' fact sheets are due 11/2/17. ESI Protocol Amended Order shall issue and shall include the agreed-upon language from section 2, page 6 (document 302). NEXT Status Conference set for 11/30/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.) (Attorneys present: Anapol, Ashley, Beil, Schafle, Flowers, Lelley, Warriner, Relkin, Raso, Ayala, Blakely, Devine, McGlamry, DiCello, Hubbard, Williams, Apjohn, Deutsch, Catullo, Schlueter, Kinsley, Lally, Degaris. Also present Robbie Bell, Ryan Crivella, Tyler Weintraub, Brendan McDonough) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
October 26, 2017 Filing 371 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/23/2017., filed by Carmen S. Knudtson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form 4-4-11)(O'Leary, Leslie) Modified text on 10/27/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 26, 2017 Filing 370 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT by Charles Melle, Susan Purtell (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHAFLE, MICHAEL) Modified text on 10/27/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 26, 2017 Filing 369 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Donald Ray Lovell.(Kelly, Clinton)
October 26, 2017 Filing 368 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Frank Palmer, Lee Ann Palmer.(Warriner, C.) Modified text on 10/27/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 26, 2017 Filing 367 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kathleen Delo.(Warriner, C.) Modified text on 10/27/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 26, 2017 Filing 366 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R. Schlueter on behalf of Susan Marvel (Schlueter, Richard)
October 26, 2017 Filing 365 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/23/2017., filed by Susan Marvel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schlueter, Richard) Modified text and party filing against on 10/27/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 26, 2017 Filing 364 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R. Schlueter on behalf of Charlotte Telgener (Schlueter, Richard)
October 26, 2017 Filing 363 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/23/2017., filed by Charlotte Telgener. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schlueter, Richard) Modified text and filer complaint is against on 10/27/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 26, 2017 Filing 362 Conditional Transfer order number 23 in MDL 2768 dated 10/26/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
October 26, 2017 Filing 361 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ESI Order Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (DaSilva, Carolina)
October 25, 2017 Filing 360 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of John Frost, Marsha Frost (Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 359 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Mildred McGuire (Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 358 COMPLAINT (Short Form) against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Mildred McGuire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 357 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Liliane Perez (Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 356 COMPLAINT (Short Form) against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Liliane Perez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 355 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Peggy Sherman (Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 354 COMPLAINT (Short Form) against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Peggy Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Category Sheet)(Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 353 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R. Schlueter on behalf of Paul Gibbs (Schlueter, Richard)
October 25, 2017 Filing 352 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Mark Trent (Relkin, Ellen) (Main Document 352 replaced on 10/26/2017 to correct document caption) (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 25, 2017 Filing 351 COMPLAINT (Short Form) against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Mark Trent. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 350 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Robert Bridges, Rosann Bridges (Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 349 COMPLAINT (Short Form) against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Robert Bridges, Rosann Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 348 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Carol Logan, Gerard Logan (Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 347 COMPLAINT (Short Form) against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Carol Logan, Gerard Logan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 346 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Robert Schulz (Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 345 COMPLAINT (Short Form) against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Robert Schulz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Relkin, Ellen) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/26/2017) (Paine, Matthew).
October 25, 2017 Filing 344 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Alan Kuehl (Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 343 COMPLAINT (Short Form) against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Alan Kuehl. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Relkin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 342 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Case Management Order No. 3 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
October 25, 2017 Filing 341 COMPLAINT against Paul Gibbs (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/23/2017., filed by Paul Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schlueter, Richard)
October 25, 2017 Filing 340 COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/23/2017., filed by Joyce Ulrich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form)(Arevalo, Kristy) Relates to 17-11333-IT (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 25, 2017 Filing 339 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL C. SCHAFLE on behalf of Judith Venegoni (SCHAFLE, MICHAEL)
October 25, 2017 Filing 338 COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/23/2017., filed by Judith Venegoni. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHAFLE, MICHAEL) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/26/2017) (Paine, Matthew).
October 25, 2017 Filing 337 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald A. Shems, Esq on behalf of Douglas Brink, Jeanne Brink (Shems, Ronald)
October 25, 2017 Filing 336 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven P. Robinson on behalf of Douglas Brink, Jeanne Brink (Robinson, Steven)
October 25, 2017 Filing 335 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter J. Nalducci on behalf of Lois Kolbosky (Nalducci, Walter) Relates to 17-cv-12086-IT (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 25, 2017 Filing 334 NOTICE of Appearance by Julianne C. Beil on behalf of LOIS KOLBOSKY (Beil, Julianne) Relates to 17-cv-12086-IT (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 24, 2017 Filing 333 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. filed by John Frost, Marsha Frost.(Relkin, Ellen) (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017. Modified text on 10/25/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 24, 2017 Filing 332 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie W O'Leary on behalf of Carmen S. Knudtson (O'Leary, Leslie)
October 24, 2017 Filing 331 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton L. Kelly on behalf of Donald Ray Lovell (Kelly, Clinton)
October 24, 2017 Filing 330 COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint and Jury Demand as to Donna Dale and James Dale, Individual Case No. 1:17-cv-12085 against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/23/2017., filed by Donna Dale, James Dale. (Attachments: # 1 Deleted due to incorrect filing )(McGlamry, Michael) (Main Document 330 replaced on 10/26/2017 to correct document caption) (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 23, 2017 Filing 329 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Elizabeth Raso on behalf of Donna Branyon, Jerry Branyon (Raso, Ashleigh)
October 23, 2017 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Joseph Gega (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 327 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Thelma Smith (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 326 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Sherryadine Judd (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Kathleen Henry (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 324 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Colleen Harmon (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 323 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Jane Shuman, Walter Shuman (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 322 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Joseph O'Keefe, Priscilla A. O'Keefe (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 321 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Dolores Egan, Matthew Egan (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 320 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Joan Travers, Michael Travers (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 319 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Dennis Nolton, Janet Nolton (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 318 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Claudine Mogg-Brandon (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 317 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Dick McGee, Gail McGee (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 316 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Ronald Kalmback, Sharon Kalmback (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 315 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Karen Eddinger, Leo Eddinger (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 314 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Gerald Dawley, Kathleen Dawley (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Douglas Brooks, Pin Q. Brooks (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 312 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Bridget Arrington, Edward S. Arrington (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 311 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Martin Star (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 310 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Mary Joyce Ninneman, Richard C. Ninneman (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 309 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Maria Sollers (Warriner, C.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 308 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. AMENDED MDL Order No. 3 (Concerning Appearances of Counsel,Including Appearances of Counsel Seeking to Directly File Actions) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
October 23, 2017 Filing 307 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. AMENDED Case Management Order. #2. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
October 20, 2017 Filing 306 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #303 Notice (Other),. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (MacDonald, Gail)
October 19, 2017 Filing 305 NOTICE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. re #302 Notice (Other) Brief Regarding Disputed ESI Protocol Provisions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Deutsch, Nicholas)
October 19, 2017 Filing 304 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Document received: Proposed Agenda for October 26, 2017 MDL Case Management Conference. (Apjohn, Nelson)
October 19, 2017 Filing 303 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee re #302 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Brief Regarding Disputed ESI Protocol Provisions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Proposed Modification to Section III of the ESI Order, #2 Exhibit Highlighted Disputed Language to Section III, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 19, 2017 Filing 302 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee Joint Proposed Order Establishing Protocol Governing Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information (ESI) (Raso, Ashleigh)
October 19, 2017 Filing 301 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Douglas Brink, Jeanne Brink.(Robinson, Steven)
October 19, 2017 Filing 300 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Donna Branyon, Jerry Branyon (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Donna Branyon, Jerry Branyon.(Raso, Ashleigh) Relates to Case Number 17-cv-12032-IT (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 19, 2017 Filing 299 Conditional Transfer order number 22 in MDL 2768 dated 10/19/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
October 17, 2017 Filing 298 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Richard Cardone.(Fleishman, Wendy)
October 16, 2017 Filing 297 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Michael Travers, Joan Travers.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 296 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Maria Sollers.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 295 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by THelma Smith.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 294 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Walter Shuman, Jane Shuman.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 293 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Joseph O'Keefe, Priscilla A. O'Keefe.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 292 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Janet Nolton, Dennis Nolton.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 291 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Richard C. Ninneman, Mary Joyce Ninneman.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 290 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Claudine Mogg-Brandon, Brent Brandon.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 289 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Dick McGee, Gail McGee.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 288 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Ronald Kalmback, Sharon Kalmback.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 287 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/12/2017.,filed by Daryl Gerber. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Category Sheet)(SCHAFLE, MICHAEL) Relates to Case Number: 17-cv-12035-IT
October 16, 2017 Filing 286 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Sherryadine Judd.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 285 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Kathleen Henry.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 284 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Colleen Harmon.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 283 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Joseph Gega.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 282 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Dolores Egan, Matthew Egan.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 281 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Leo Eddinger, Karen Eddinger.(Warriner, C.)
October 16, 2017 Filing 280 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/12/2017., filed by Gordon Williams, Sandra Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Devine, Brian) Relates to Case Number: 17-cv-11994-IT
October 16, 2017 Filing 279 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #275 Complaint by Douglas Brooks, Pin Q. Brooks. (Warriner, C.) (Main Document 279 replaced on 10/16/2017 due to fillable format) (DaSilva, Carolina).
October 13, 2017 Filing 278 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Ashley on behalf of Jean Hester (Ashley, Jennifer)
October 13, 2017 Filing 277 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #276 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Jean Hester. (Ashley, Jennifer)
October 13, 2017 Filing 276 COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint and Jury Demand against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Jean Hester.(Ashley, Jennifer) Relates to 17-cv-11861-IT
October 13, 2017 Filing 275 COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017.), filed by Douglas Brooks, Pin Q. Brooks.(Warriner, C.) Relates to 17-cv-11999-IT
October 13, 2017 Filing 274 COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017.), filed by Martin Star.(Warriner, C.) Relates to 17-cv-11998-IT
October 13, 2017 Filing 273 COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017.), filed by Kathleen Dawley, Gerald Dawley.(Warriner, C.) Relates to 17-cv-11997-IT
October 13, 2017 Filing 272 COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017.), filed by Bridget Arrington, Edward S. Arrington.(Warriner, C.) Relates to 17-cv-11996-IT
October 13, 2017 Filing 271 COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Beth A. Segerstrom, Steven M. Segerstrom.(Warriner, C.)
October 13, 2017 Filing 270 COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Ardis M. Proue, Edward F. Proue.(Warriner, C.)
October 13, 2017 Filing 269 COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants (Fee Status: Waived Pursuant to Order in an MDL case). Case is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the Order waiving the fee was entered on 10/11/2017., filed by Cindy F. Smith, James M. Smith.(Warriner, C.)
October 12, 2017 Filing 268 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
October 11, 2017 Filing 267 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Case Management Order No. 2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
October 11, 2017 Filing 266 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 11, 2017 Filing 265 Transcript of Status Conference held on September 28, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 11/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2018. (Scalfani, Deborah)
October 11, 2017 Filing 264 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER TERMINATING CIVIL ACTION 17-CV-10905-ITAssociated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-10905-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
October 10, 2017 Filing 263 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart C. Talley on behalf of Anthony Paciolla (Talley, Stuart)
October 10, 2017 Filing 262 NOTICE of Appearance by William Alter Kershaw on behalf of Anthony Paciolla (Kershaw, William)
October 10, 2017 Filing 261 Conditional Transfer order number 21 in MDL 2768 dated 10/3/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
October 5, 2017 Filing 260 NOTICE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Enclosing Revised Proposed Protective Order and Meet and Confer Query (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order, #2 Supplement Meet and Confer Query Regarding Competitor Consultants)(Deutsch, Nicholas)
October 5, 2017 Filing 259 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee re #227 MOTION to Modify Proposed Protective Order Status Report of Meet and Confer Discussions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Raso, Ashleigh)
October 5, 2017 Filing 258 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee Rule 26(f) Proposal (Raso, Ashleigh)
October 2, 2017 Filing 257 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Document received: Proposed Case Management Order No. 2. (Williams, Gene)
September 29, 2017 Filing 256 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
September 28, 2017 Filing 255 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Case Management Conference held on 9/28/2017. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. Proposed Orders to be filed as a Notice, with a joint proposed Order attached as an Exhibit. If adopted, the Order will be issued by the court. Short form complaints and answers shall be filed as originally directed, both on the individual case docket and the master MDL docket. Parties to complete Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) initial disclosures. Brief product day scheduled for 10/26/2017, no more than 30 minutes total. Parties to submit via email to clerk an updated Proposed Protective Order in Word form. Parties to submit Rule 26(f) proposal by 10/5/2017. Next case management conf. set for 10/26/17 at 11:00 a.m. Orders to follow. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Apjohn, Arevalo, Ayala, Blakely, Catullo, Crone, Curry, DeGaris, Deutsch, Devine, DiCello, Ferrera, Fleishman, Flowers, Graham, Hubbard, Johnston, Kelley, Kinsley, Lee, McGlamry, Jonathan Hogins for Willard Moody (Hogins' appearance must be entered), Osborne, Osteen, Raso, Relkin, Riley, Schlueter, Shafle, Seithel, Shems, Talley, Wedhwani, Warriner, Weintraub, Williams ) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
September 27, 2017 Filing 254 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Proposed Case Management Order 3. (Kelley, Walter)
September 27, 2017 Filing 253 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Document received: Rule 26(f) Discovery Proposal. (Deutsch, Nicholas)
September 27, 2017 Filing 252 Conditional Transfer order number 20 in MDL 2768 dated 9/27/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
September 26, 2017 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason P Johnston on behalf of Amy Davidson, Niels Foster (Johnston, Jason)
September 26, 2017 Filing 250 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Proposed Implementation Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Defendant Fact Sheet)(Raso, Ashleigh)
September 26, 2017 Filing 249 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Document received: Proposed Case Management Order #2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Master Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Short Form Complaint)(Raso, Ashleigh)
September 26, 2017 Filing 248 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Document received: Proposed Agenda for 9.28.17 CMC. (Deutsch, Nicholas)
September 21, 2017 Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance by James N. Osteen, Jr on behalf of Betty Shuman (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(Osteen, James)
September 20, 2017 Filing 246 Conditional Transfer order number 19 in MDL 2768 dated 9/20/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
September 19, 2017 Filing 245 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Document received: Order Establishing Protocol Governing Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"). (Deutsch, Nicholas)
September 18, 2017 Filing 244 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Lee Ann Palmer, Frank Palmer (Warriner, C.) USDC of MA Case No: 1:17-cv-11713-IT
September 18, 2017 Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of KATHLEEN DELO (Warriner, C.)
September 18, 2017 Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Osborne on behalf of Barry Day, JOSEPH KOTULKA, Charles Edward Haack (Osborne, Joseph)
September 18, 2017 Filing 241 Conditional Transfer order number 18 in MDL 2768 dated 9/15/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
September 15, 2017 Filing 240 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #239 MOTION for Extension of Time to reach an agreement on Electronically Stored Information, Defendant Fact Sheets, and Plaintiff Fact Sheets by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. The Parties shall submit an agreed-upon proposed Order Governing Electronically Stored Information and Plaintiffs and Defendants Fact Sheets by September 19, 2017. If the Parties are unable to reach an agreement, the Parties shall separately submit their proposals with briefing in support thereof on or before September 22, 2017.(DaSilva, Carolina)
September 14, 2017 Filing 239 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 22, 2017 to to reach an agreement on Electronically Stored Information, Defendant Fact Sheets, and Plaintiff Fact Sheets by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.(Raso, Ashleigh)
September 12, 2017 Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy R. Fleishman on behalf of Richard Cardone (Fleishman, Wendy)
September 12, 2017 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam H. Weintraub on behalf of Richard Cardone (Weintraub, Adam)
September 8, 2017 Filing 236 Conditional Transfer order number 17 in MDL 2768 dated 9/8/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
September 6, 2017 Filing 235 Conditional Transfer order number 16 in MDL 2768 dated 9/1/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
September 1, 2017 Filing 234 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND Cooney v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. et al., No. 17-cv-10829-IT,Crowley v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. et al., No. 17-cv-10830-IT, Mayo v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. et al., No. 17-cv-10832-IT, are hereby REMANDED to the Superior Court of Massachusetts, Suffolk County.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-10829-IT, 1:17-cv-10830-IT, 1:17-cv-10832-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
August 31, 2017 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex C. Davis on behalf of Stewart C. Pelton (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 31, 2017 Filing 232 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING: #148 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henry Cooney (17-cv-10829-IT, [#11]) #149 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carol Ann Mayo (17-cv-10832-IT, [#11]) #150 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Donald Crowley (17-cv-10830-IT, [#11]) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-10829-IT, 1:17-cv-10830-IT, 1:17-cv-10832-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
August 31, 2017 Filing 231 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-10829-IT, 1:17-cv-10830-IT, 1:17-cv-10832-IT(Scalfani, Deborah)
August 31, 2017 Filing 230 Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Remand held on August 1, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 9/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-10829-IT, 1:17-cv-10830-IT, 1:17-cv-10832-IT(Scalfani, Deborah)
August 25, 2017 Filing 229 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. to #228 Proposed Document(s) submitted. (Apjohn, Nelson)
August 25, 2017 Filing 228 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Document received: Proposed Protective Order. (Apjohn, Nelson)
August 25, 2017 Filing 227 MOTION to Modify Proposed Protective Order by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Current Proposed Protective Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- In re Benicar, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4- In re Xarelto, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5- Younes v. 7-Eleven, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6- In re Testosterone, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7- Benicar Stipulated Protective Order, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8- PLOS Salespeople in the Surgical Suite, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9- In re Mentor Corp., #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10- In re: E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Co., #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11- C.R. Bard Pelvic PTO #48, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12- In re Nuvaring Memorandum)(Raso, Ashleigh)
August 25, 2017 Filing 226 Conditional Transfer order number 15 in MDL 2768 dated 8/25/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
August 24, 2017 Filing 225 Conditional Transfer order number 14 in MDL 2768 dated 8/22/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
August 23, 2017 Filing 224 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P. Krull on behalf of Susan Adelman (Krull, Gregory)
August 23, 2017 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P. Krull on behalf of Bernard Hoare (Krull, Gregory)
August 14, 2017 Filing 222 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-10829-IT, 1:17-cv-10830-IT, 1:17-cv-10832-IT(Scalfani, Deborah)
August 14, 2017 Filing 221 Transcript of Status Conference held on August 1, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 9/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 14, 2017 Filing 220 Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Remand held on August 1, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 9/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-10829-IT, 1:17-cv-10830-IT, 1:17-cv-10832-IT(Scalfani, Deborah)
August 11, 2017 Filing 219 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #148 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #150 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #149 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Apjohn, Nelson)
August 11, 2017 Filing 218 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING (212) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. In case 1:17-md-02768-IT. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-10829-IT, 1:17-cv-10830-IT, 1:17-cv-10832-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
August 10, 2017 Filing 217 Conditional Transfer order number 13 in MDL 2768 dated 8/10/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
August 8, 2017 Filing 216 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Case Management Order No. 1 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
August 8, 2017 Filing 215 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Proposed agenda due 9/21/17. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 7, 2017 Filing 212 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Apjohn, Nelson)
August 4, 2017 Filing 211 EXHIBIT re #210 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Exhibit A, Exhibit B, Exhibit C by Henry Cooney, Donald Crowley, Carol Ann Mayo. (Kelley, Walter)
August 4, 2017 Filing 210 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #148 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #150 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #149 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Henry Cooney, Donald Crowley, Carol Ann Mayo. (Kelley, Walter) (Main Document 210 replaced on 8/7/2017 to include signature page) (DaSilva, Carolina).
August 2, 2017 Filing 209 Conditional Transfer order in MDL 2768 dated 8/2/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
August 1, 2017 Filing 214 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 8/1/2017. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. Case Management Conferences to be set for the last Thursday of each month when possible. Counsel may contact the clerk for any short conferences to be set in between. One week prior to all Case Management/Status Conferences a proposed agenda shall be submitted. Next conference to be set Thurs., 9/28/17 at 11:00. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Apjohn, Arevalo, Ayala, Blakely, Bliss, Catullo, Crone, Deutsch, Devine, DiCello, Dougherty, Fleishman, Flowers, Hubbard, Johnston, Kelley, Kershaw, Lee, Mann, McDonough, Moody, Nemo, Pittner, Raso, Relkin, Riley, Robinson, Schlueter, Seeger, Seithel, Warriner, Zimmerman) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
August 1, 2017 Filing 213 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2017 re: ( #11 in 1:17-cv-10829-IT) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sandra Cooney, Henry Cooney, ( #11 in 1:17-cv-10830-IT) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Erin Coughlin Crowley, Donald Crowley, ( #11 in 1:17-cv-10832-IT) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Carol Ann Mayo, John Mayo, ( #148 in 1:17-md-02768-IT) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Henry Cooney, ( #150 in 1:17-md-02768-IT) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Donald Crowley, ( #149 in 1:17-md-02768-IT) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Carol Ann Mayo. Case called. Court hears argument from counsel. Plaintiff to submit 3 page brief. Motions taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.) (Attorneys present: Kelley, Relkin, Flowers, Blakely, Bliss, Hubbard, Deutch, Apjohn, Catullo) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-10829-IT, 1:17-cv-10830-IT, 1:17-cv-10832-IT(MacDonald, Gail)
August 1, 2017 Filing 208 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Document received: Proposed Case Management Order No. 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Apjohn, Nelson)
July 31, 2017 Filing 207 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Seithel on behalf of Lawrence Diedrich, Linda Diedrich (Seithel, Lynn)
July 31, 2017 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristy M Arevalo on behalf of Joyce Ulrich 17-cv-11333-IT (Arevalo, Kristy) Modified text on 8/1/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
July 31, 2017 Filing 205 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 12 re: August 1, 2017 Status Conference. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
July 27, 2017 Filing 204 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion (148 in 1:17-md-02768-IT) MOTION to Remand to State Court , (150 in 1:17-md-02768-IT) MOTION to Remand to State Court , (149 in 1:17-md-02768-IT) MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
July 27, 2017 Filing 203 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Richard Fredette. Acknowledgement filed by Richard Fredette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proof of Service)(Kelley, Walter) Modified filer on 7/27/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
July 22, 2017 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL C. SCHAFLE on behalf of David L Johnson, Paula Johnson, Charles Melle, Susan Purtell, David T. Stewart, Donna Stewart (SCHAFLE, MICHAEL)
July 19, 2017 Filing 201 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Diane M. Johnson. Acknowledgement filed by Diane M. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Ayala, Thomas)
July 19, 2017 Filing 200 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Robert Green. Acknowledgement filed by Robert Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Ayala, Thomas)
July 19, 2017 Filing 199 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Beverly Landis. Acknowledgement filed by Beverly Landis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Ayala, Thomas)
July 19, 2017 Filing 198 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Bob Kareis, Dorothy Kareis. Acknowledgement filed by Bob Kareis, Dorothy Kareis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Ayala, Thomas)
July 17, 2017 Filing 197 Conditional Transfer order number 12 in MDL 2768 dated the mdl panel from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
July 14, 2017 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald A. Shems, Esq on behalf of Douglas Brink, Jeanne Brink (Shems, Ronald)
July 14, 2017 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven P. Robinson on behalf of Douglas Brink, Jeanne Brink (Robinson, Steven) Appearance filed incorrectly using a different CM/ECF account. Please refer to DE #196 . (DaSilva, Carolina).
July 14, 2017 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven P. Robinson on behalf of Douglas Brink, Jeanne Brink (Robinson, Steven)
July 12, 2017 Filing 193 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 12, 2017 Filing 192 Transcript of Status Conference held on June 29, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 8/2/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 12, 2017 Filing 191 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 8/1/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
July 6, 2017 Filing 190 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Beverly Landis. Acknowledgement filed by Beverly Landis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Ayala, Thomas)
July 6, 2017 Filing 189 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Diane M. Johnson. Acknowledgement filed by Diane M. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Ayala, Thomas)
July 6, 2017 Filing 188 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Robert Green. Acknowledgement filed by Robert Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Ayala, Thomas)
July 6, 2017 Filing 187 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Bob Kareis, Dorothy Kareis. Acknowledgement filed by Bob Kareis, Dorothy Kareis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Ayala, Thomas)
July 6, 2017 Filing 186 Conditional Transfer order number 11 in MDL 2768 dated 7/6/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
July 5, 2017 Filing 185 NOTICE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. of Pending State Court Actions (Apjohn, Nelson)
July 5, 2017 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda S. Fulmer on behalf of Ardis M. Proue, Edward F. Proue (Fulmer, Brenda)
June 30, 2017 Filing 183 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 11 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail) Modified text on 7/7/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
June 30, 2017 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeleine M. McDonough on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (McDonough, Madeleine) Modified party counsel appearing on behalf of on 7/7/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
June 29, 2017 Filing 182 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 6/29/2017. Case is called. Court has colloquy with counsel. Defense counsel shall report which law firm should be listed on the docket as lead attorney and which should be listed as to be noticed only. Counsel report that neither Kim Dougherty nor Lisa Lee will submit an application for a leadership role. Defendant shall submit notice in regard to the Florida cases and the presiding judges name. Counsel shall submit a proposed procedural order prior to next Case Management Conference. Parties shall jointly reach out to courtroom deputy to set another Case Management Conference; tentatively the first week of August 2017. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.) (Attorneys present: Apjohn, Ayala, Blakely, Bliss, Catullo, DeGaris, Deutsch, Devine, DiCello, Dougherty, Fleishman, Flowers, Hubbard, Johnston, Kelley, Kershaw, Kinsley, McGlamery, McDonough (to enter appearance), Moody, Osborne, Raso, Relkin, Schlueter, Seeger, Warriner, Fulmer (to enter an appearance)) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
June 28, 2017 Filing 180 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Aaron Powell. Acknowledgement filed by Aaron Powell. (Dougherty, Kimberly)
June 28, 2017 Filing 179 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 10 SEE attached Order re: 6/29/17 Status Conference. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail) Modified text on 7/7/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
June 27, 2017 Filing 178 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 6/29/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. As stated in Paragraph 1 of the court's MDL Order No. 6, only counsel who have filed a Notice of MDL Appearance on the master MDL docket 17-md-2768 may participate by telephone in a court proceeding in this matter. For attorneys who have filed the required Notice of Appearance on the master MDL docket 17-md-2768, the teleconference information for the June 29, 2017, status conference is as follows: 888-808-6929 and enter code 8523158# Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
June 26, 2017 Filing 177 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons executed Stryker Sales Corp)(Pope, N.)
June 26, 2017 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Crone on behalf of Aaron Powell (Crone, John)
June 26, 2017 Filing 175 Conditional Transfer order number 10 in MDL 2768 dated 6/23/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
June 23, 2017 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Willard James Moody, Jr on behalf of Aaron Powell (Moody, Willard)
June 23, 2017 Filing 173 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Lisa B. Weinstein (Weinstein, Lisa)
June 21, 2017 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason P Johnston on behalf of Robert Pakela, Camilla Pakela (Johnston, Jason)
June 20, 2017 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S Riley on behalf of Robert Green, Bob Kareis, Dorothy Kareis, Beverly Landis (Riley, Stephanie)
June 20, 2017 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Elizabeth Graham on behalf of Robert Green, Bob Kareis, Dorothy Kareis, Beverly Landis (Graham, M.)
June 20, 2017 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas V. Ayala on behalf of Bob Kareis, Dorothy Kareis, Beverly Landis, Robert Green (Ayala, Thomas)
June 19, 2017 Filing 168 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for: #148 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #151 Memorandum in Support of Motion. #149 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #152 Memorandum in Support of Motion. #150 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #154 Memorandum in Support of Motion. #167 Opposition to Motion. Counsel who filed the document are requested to submit a courtesy copy to the Clerk's Office by June 22, 2017. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, contain appropriate (number/letter) tabs, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a 3-ring binder. (DaSilva, Carolina)
June 16, 2017 Filing 167 Opposition re #148 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #150 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #149 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Apjohn, Nelson)
June 16, 2017 Filing 166 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Dougherty, Kimberly)
June 16, 2017 Filing 165 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Dougherty, Kimberly)
June 16, 2017 Filing 164 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Stryker LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation. Document received: Plaintiffs' Agreed Nomination for Leadership Structure. (Kelley, Walter)
June 16, 2017 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Dougherty on behalf of Aaron Powell (Dougherty, Kimberly)
June 15, 2017 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Osborne on behalf of Charles Melle, Susan Purtell, David T. Stewart, Donna Stewart, Paul Pfeufer, David L. Johnson, Paula Johnson, Lawrence Diedrich and Linda Diedrich (Osborne, Joseph ) Modified text to add party names counsel appearing on behalf on 6/16/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
June 15, 2017 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Osborne on behalf of Eugene Willard (Osborne, Joseph) Modified text to add party name counsel appearing on behalf on 6/16/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
June 15, 2017 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy R. Fleishman on behalf of Rosanne Gmuer (Fleishman, Wendy)
June 15, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason P Johnston on behalf of Leo Boutiette, John Noennig, Janet Noennig, Kenton Beachy (Johnston, Jason)
June 15, 2017 Filing 158 Conditional Transfer order number 9 in MDL 2768 dated 6/15/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
June 9, 2017 Filing 157 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered.MDL Order No. 9 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
June 9, 2017 Filing 156 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 8 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
June 8, 2017 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Devine on behalf of Carol Logan, Gerard Logan (Devine, Brian)
June 8, 2017 Filing 153 Conditional Transfer order number 8 in MDL 2768 dated 6/8/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
June 7, 2017 Filing 154 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #150 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Donald Crowley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) Pursuant to the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Section (G) Number (4): Any memorandum of law or other attachment filed in support of a main document shall be filed as a separate document, using the proper event.(DaSilva, Carolina)
June 7, 2017 Filing 152 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #149 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Carol Ann Mayo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) Pursuant to the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Section (G) Number (4): Any memorandum of law or other attachment filed in support of a main document shall be filed as a separate document, using the proper event.(DaSilva, Carolina)
June 7, 2017 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #148 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Henry Cooney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) Pursuant to the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Section (G) Number (4): Any memorandum of law or other attachment filed in support of a main document shall be filed as a separate document, using the proper event.(DaSilva, Carolina)
June 7, 2017 Filing 150 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Donald Crowley. (Attachments: (Kelley, Walter) Modified event by removing the attached memorandum in support/exhibits and docketed those pleadings as separate event on 6/8/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
June 7, 2017 Filing 149 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carol Ann Mayo. (Attachments: (Kelley, Walter) Modified event by removing the attached memorandum in support/exhibits and docketed those pleadings as separate event on 6/8/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
June 7, 2017 Filing 148 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henry Cooney. (Attachments: (Kelley, Walter) Modified event by removing the attached memorandum in support/exhibits and docketed those pleadings as separate event on 6/8/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
June 7, 2017 Filing 147 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Betty S. Sadler. Acknowledgement filed by Betty S. Sadler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Service)(Nemo, Anthony)
June 7, 2017 Filing 146 Conditional Transfer order number 7 in MDL 2768 dated 6/7/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
June 6, 2017 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart C. Talley on behalf of Eleanor Zimny (Talley, Stuart)
June 6, 2017 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart C. Talley on behalf of Sara Thompson (Talley, Stuart)
June 6, 2017 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart C. Talley on behalf of Sally Serrago (Talley, Stuart)
June 6, 2017 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart C. Talley on behalf of Donald E. Rodgers (Talley, Stuart)
June 6, 2017 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart C. Talley on behalf of Rolande Baker (Talley, Stuart)
June 6, 2017 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by William Alter Kershaw on behalf of Eleanor Zimny (Kershaw, William)
June 6, 2017 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by William Alter Kershaw on behalf of Sara Thompson (Kershaw, William)
June 6, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by William Alter Kershaw on behalf of Sally Serrago (Kershaw, William)
June 6, 2017 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by William Alter Kershaw on behalf of Donald E. Rodgers (Kershaw, William)
June 6, 2017 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by William Alter Kershaw on behalf of Rolande Baker (Kershaw, William)
June 6, 2017 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Saunders on behalf of Francis T. Hassett (Saunders, Joseph)
June 6, 2017 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Saunders on behalf of Henry C. Rayburn (Saunders, Joseph)
June 1, 2017 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Neelum J. Wadhwani on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Wadhwani, Neelum)
May 30, 2017 Filing 132 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Stryker LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation. Document received: Plaintiffs' Proposed Modifications to Draft MDL Order No. 8. (Flowers, Peter)
May 30, 2017 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R. Schlueter on behalf of Susan Marvel (Schlueter, Richard)
May 30, 2017 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R. Schlueter on behalf of Charlotte Telgener (Schlueter, Richard)
May 30, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R. Schlueter on behalf of Linda Land (Schlueter, Richard)
May 30, 2017 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R. Schlueter on behalf of Paul Gibbs (Schlueter, Richard)
May 30, 2017 Filing 127 Conditional Transfer order number 6 in MDL 2768 dated 5/30/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 26, 2017 Filing 126 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 26, 2017 Filing 125 Transcript of Status Conference held on May 16, 2017, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 6/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 24, 2017 Filing 124 Conditional Transfer order number 5 in MDL 2768 dated 5/24/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 22, 2017 Filing 123 Conditional Transfer order number 4 in MDL 2768 dated 5/22/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 18, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE re: Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs' Counsel (Attachments: #1 [Draft] MDL Order No. 8)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
May 18, 2017 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S Mann on behalf of David Campbell, Glenda Campbell (Mann, Jonathan)
May 18, 2017 Filing 119 Conditional Transfer order number 3 in MDL 2768 dated 5/18/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 16, 2017 Filing 122 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 5/16/2017. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel re: Plaintiffs' leadership structure, subject matter jurisdiction, case organization. Stay remains in place. Order to follow. Next Status Conference set for 6/29/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Dougherty, Osborne, Zimmerman, Kelley, Seeger, Ellen Relkin, Flowers, Lee, Gogell, DeGarris, DiCello, Warner, McGlamery, Talley, Ayella, Riley, Kingsley, Johnston, Kershaw, Schlater, Moody, Blakely, Williams, Hubbard, Apjohn, Nemo, Raso, Dolejsi, Pittner, Goldenberg, Anapol) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(MacDonald, Gail)
May 16, 2017 Filing 118 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The docket clerk shall terminate from the master MDL docket Plaintiffs Bob Kareis and Dorothy Kareis, who are not yet parties in any coordinated action currently before this court. Counsel are directed not to file Notices of Appearance for Plaintiffs in cases subject to a Conditional Transfer Order that has been stayed or that have otherwise not yet been transferred to the MDL. Terminated: Bob Kareis and Dorothy Kareis (DaSilva, Carolina)
May 16, 2017 Filing 117 Conditional Transfer order number 2 in MDL 2768 dated 5/16/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 16, 2017 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Liliane Perez (Relkin, Ellen)
May 16, 2017 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas N. Deutsch on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Deutsch, Nicholas)
May 16, 2017 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Seeger on behalf of Gerard Logan (Seeger, Kenneth)
May 16, 2017 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Kelley on behalf of Henry C. Rayburn (Kelley, Walter)
May 15, 2017 Filing 112 STATUS REPORT by Gerard Logan, Carol Logan. (Farrell, Jaime)
May 15, 2017 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa S. Lee on behalf of Diane M. Johnson (Lee, Lisa)
May 15, 2017 Filing 110 STATUS REPORT by Richard Fredette. (Kelley, Walter)
May 15, 2017 Filing 109 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC Electronic Order: ALLOWING Attorney Joseph A. Osborne's Motion Seeking Leave to Participate in Status Conference as Interested Party #44 , Attorney Richard R. Schlueter's Motion Seeking Leave to Participate in Status Conference as Interested Party #45 , and Attorney Willard J. Moody, Jr.'s Motion Seeking Leave to Participate in Status Conference as Interested Party #91 . If Attorneys Osborne, Schlueter or Moody wish to attend the May 16, 2017, status conference by telephone, they may e-mail the courtroom clerk at gail_macdonald@mad.uscourts.gov or the docket clerk at carolina_dasilva@mad.uscourts.gov before noon for a call-in number and access code. (adminn, )
May 15, 2017 Filing 108 Judge Indira Talwani: Electronic Order: DENYING AS MOOT Motion Seeking Leave to Participate in Status Conference as Interested Party #89 . Gerard Logan and Carol Logan v. Howmedica Osteonics dba Stryker Orthopaideics and Stryker Corp. [17-cv-10846], was filed directly in this district as a related case, and as of May 15, 2017, is being treated as a coordinated action pursuant to MDL Order No. 1, par. 1. The deadline for Plaintiffs' counsel Kenneth M. Seeger to file a Notice of MDL Appearance on the master MDL docket 17-md-2768 and the individual case file, and to e-mail the clerk or docket clerk for a call-in number and access code as set forth in MDL Order No. 7 (Attendance and Participation of Counsel at Initial Status Conference), is extended to noon on May 16, 2017. (adminn, )
May 15, 2017 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Kelley on behalf of Richard Fredette (Kelley, Walter)
May 15, 2017 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Dougherty on behalf of Christine McCooe, John R. Crone (Dougherty, Kimberly)
May 15, 2017 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula S. Bliss on behalf of Leo Boutiette, Henry Cooney, Donald Crowley, Carol Ann Mayo, Christine McCooe (Bliss, Paula)
May 15, 2017 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Kelley on behalf of Leo Boutiette, Henry Cooney, Donald Crowley, Carol Ann Mayo, Christine McCooe (Kelley, Walter)
May 15, 2017 Filing 103 STATUS REPORT by Robert Bridges, Rosann Bridges. (Relkin, Ellen)
May 15, 2017 Filing 102 STATUS REPORT by Robert Schulz. (Relkin, Ellen)
May 15, 2017 Filing 101 STATUS REPORT of Powell and McCooe by Christine McCooe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Schedule of Actions)(Dougherty, Kimberly)
May 15, 2017 Filing 100 STATUS REPORT by Gladys Layne, Russell Layne. (Flowers, Peter)
May 15, 2017 Filing 99 STATUS REPORT by Leanne Halfman. (Flowers, Peter)
May 15, 2017 Filing 98 STATUS REPORT by Deborah Denne, LeRoy Denne, Carol Keller, Daniel Keller, Mary Jean Pitts, Betty S. Sadler, Daniel Smeins, Patton Witt. (Nemo, Anthony)
May 15, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Genevieve Zimmerman on behalf of Patton Witt (Zimmerman, Genevieve)
May 15, 2017 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Genevieve Zimmerman on behalf of Mary Jean Pitts (Zimmerman, Genevieve)
May 15, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Genevieve Zimmerman on behalf of Deborah Denne, LeRoy Denne (Zimmerman, Genevieve)
May 15, 2017 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Genevieve Zimmerman on behalf of Carol Keller, Daniel Keller (Zimmerman, Genevieve)
May 15, 2017 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Genevieve Zimmerman on behalf of Betty S. Sadler (Zimmerman, Genevieve)
May 15, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Genevieve Zimmerman on behalf of Daniel Smeins (Zimmerman, Genevieve)
May 15, 2017 Filing 91 MOTION Seeking Leave to Participate in Status Conference as Interested Party by Willard J. Moody.(Dougherty, Kimberly) Modified text on 5/15/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina).
May 15, 2017 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Dougherty on behalf of Christine McCooe (Dougherty, Kimberly)
May 15, 2017 Filing 89 MOTION Seeking Leave to Participate in Status Conference as Interested Party by Kenneth M. Seeger.(DaSilva, Carolina)
May 15, 2017 Filing 88 STATUS REPORT by Robert Andrukaitis. (Anapol, Thomas)
May 15, 2017 Filing 87 STATUS REPORT by Liliane Perez. (Relkin, Ellen)
May 15, 2017 Filing 86 STATUS REPORT by Leo Boutiette, Debbie Brown, Dennis Brown. (Johnston, Jason)
May 14, 2017 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. DiCello on behalf of Cindy F. Smith, James M. Smith (DiCello, Mark)
May 12, 2017 Filing 84 STATUS REPORT by John Frost, Marsha Frost. (Relkin, Ellen)
May 12, 2017 Filing 83 STATUS REPORT by Alan Kuehl. (Relkin, Ellen)
May 12, 2017 Filing 82 STATUS REPORT by Mildred McGuire. (Relkin, Ellen)
May 12, 2017 Filing 81 STATUS REPORT by Peggy Sherman. (Relkin, Ellen)
May 12, 2017 Filing 80 STATUS REPORT by Mark Trent. (Relkin, Ellen)
May 12, 2017 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Elizabeth Raso on behalf of Patton Witt (Raso, Ashleigh)
May 12, 2017 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Elizabeth Raso on behalf of Daniel Smeins (Raso, Ashleigh)
May 12, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Elizabeth Raso on behalf of Betty S. Sadler (Raso, Ashleigh)
May 12, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Elizabeth Raso on behalf of Mary Jean Pitts (Raso, Ashleigh)
May 12, 2017 Filing 75 STATUS REPORT in Response to MDL Order No. 5 by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Williams, Gene)
May 12, 2017 Filing 74 STATUS REPORT of DeGaris & Rogers, LLC by Rosanne Gmuer. (DeGaris, Annesley)
May 12, 2017 Filing 73 STATUS REPORT by William D'Orlando, Joseph Driscoll, Janice O'Hare, Robert O'Hare, Linda Regan, Henry Cooney, Donald Crowley, Carol Ann Mayo, Leo Boutiette, Richard Fredette, Henry C. Rayburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Schedule of Actions)(Kelley, Walter)
May 12, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Nemo on behalf of Betty S. Sadler (Nemo, Anthony)
May 12, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Nemo on behalf of Mary Jean Pitts (Nemo, Anthony)
May 12, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Nemo on behalf of Daniel Smeins (Nemo, Anthony)
May 12, 2017 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Nemo on behalf of Carol Keller, Daniel Keller (Nemo, Anthony)
May 12, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Nemo on behalf of Patton Witt (Nemo, Anthony)
May 12, 2017 Filing 67 STATUS REPORT of GoldenbergLaw by Donald Belisle. (Pittner, Laura)
May 12, 2017 Filing 66 STATUS REPORT of M. Elizabeth Graham, Thomas V. Ayala, and Stephanie S. Riley by Diane M. Johnson. (Graham, M.)
May 12, 2017 Filing 65 STATUS REPORT of Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, P.C. by Donna Dale, James Dale. (McGlamry, Michael)
May 12, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Kinsley on behalf of Linda Regan (Kinsley, Brian)
May 12, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Anapol on behalf of ROBERT ANDRUKAITIS (Anapol, Thomas)
May 12, 2017 Filing 62 STATUS REPORT by Beth A. Segerstrom, Steven M. Segerstrom. (Warriner, C.)
May 12, 2017 Filing 61 STATUS REPORT by Cindy F. Smith, James M. Smith. (Warriner, C.)
May 12, 2017 Filing 60 STATUS REPORT by Ardis M. Proue, Edward F. Proue. (Warriner, C.)
May 12, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Steven M. Segerstrom, Beth A. Segerstrom (Warriner, C.)
May 12, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Cindy F. Smith, James M. Smith (Warriner, C.)
May 12, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Calvin Warriner, III on behalf of Ardis M. Proue, Edward F. Proue (Warriner, C.)
May 12, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. McGlamry on behalf of Donna Dale, James Dale (McGlamry, Michael)
May 12, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Elizabeth Graham on behalf of Bob Kareis, Dorothy Kareis (Graham, M.)
May 12, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S Riley on behalf of Bob Kareis, Dorothy Kareis (Riley, Stephanie)
May 12, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas V. Ayala on behalf of Bob Kareis, Dorothy Kareis (Ayala, Thomas)
May 12, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Nemo on behalf of Deborah Denne, LeRoy Denne (Nemo, Anthony)
May 12, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Elizabeth Raso on behalf of DANIEL KELLER, Carol Keller (Raso, Ashleigh)
May 12, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Elizabeth Raso on behalf of LeRoy Denne, Deborah Denne (Raso, Ashleigh)
May 12, 2017 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT of Gogel & Gogel by Jane Provenzano, Peter Provenzano. (Gogel, Kenneth)
May 12, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly H. Dolejsi on behalf of Cindy F. Smith, James M. Smith (Dolejsi, Holly)
May 11, 2017 Filing 47 STATUS REPORT of Kershaw Cook & Talley PC by William D'Orlando, Joseph Driscoll. (Talley, Stuart)
May 11, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim M. Catullo on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Catullo, Kim)
May 11, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION Seeking Leave to Participate in Status Conference as Interested Party by Richard R. Schlueter. (MacDonald, Gail)
May 11, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION Seeking Leave to Participate in Status Conference as Interested Party by Joseph A. Osborne.(DaSilva, Carolina)
May 10, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Gogel on behalf of Jane Provenzano, Peter Provenzano (Gogel, Kenneth)
May 10, 2017 Filing 42 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 7 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
May 9, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara D. Sutton on behalf of James M. Smith, Cindy F. Smith (Sutton, Tara)
May 9, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Smiertka on behalf of Diane M. Johnson (Smiertka, Stephanie)
May 9, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Elizabeth Graham on behalf of Diane M. Johnson (Graham, M.)
May 9, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas V. Ayala on behalf of Diane M. Johnson (Ayala, Thomas) (Main Document 38 replaced on 5/11/2017 due to filling error) (DaSilva, Carolina).
May 9, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason P Johnston on behalf of Dennis Brown, Debbie Brown (Johnston, Jason)
May 8, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi K. Hubbard on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Hubbard, Heidi)
May 8, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart L. Goldenberg on behalf of Donald Belisle (Goldenberg, Stuart)
May 8, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura L Pittner on behalf of Donald Belisle (Pittner, Laura)
May 7, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn M. Curry on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Curry, Dawn)
May 5, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Robert Schulz (Relkin, Ellen)
May 5, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Robert Bridges, Rosann Bridges (Relkin, Ellen)
May 5, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Mark Trent (Relkin, Ellen)
May 5, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of John Frost, Marsha Frost (Relkin, Ellen)
May 5, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Mildred McGuire (Relkin, Ellen)
May 5, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Alan Kuehl (Relkin, Ellen)
May 5, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Peggy Sherman (Relkin, Ellen)
May 5, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Annesley H DeGaris on behalf of Rosanne Gmuer (DeGaris, Annesley)
May 5, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula S. Bliss on behalf of William D'Orlando, Joseph Driscoll, Janice O'Hare, Robert O'Hare, Linda Regan (Bliss, Paula)
May 5, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Kelley on behalf of William D'Orlando, Joseph Driscoll, Robert O'Hare, Janice O'Hare, Linda Regan (Kelley, Walter)
May 3, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Blakely, Jr. on behalf of Donna Dale, James Dale (Blakely, Jr., Michael)
May 3, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by N. Kirkland Pope on behalf of Donna Dale, James Dale (Pope, N.)
May 3, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by William Alter Kershaw on behalf of Joseph Driscoll (Kershaw, William)
May 3, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by William Alter Kershaw on behalf of William D'Orlando (Kershaw, William)
May 3, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Flowers on behalf of Leanne Halfman, Russell Layne and Gladys Layne (Flowers, Peter) Modified text to correct party names on 5/3/2017 (DaSilva, Carolina). This document relates to: 17cv10605-IT and 17cv10673-IT
May 3, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart C. Talley on behalf of William D'Orlando (Talley, Stuart)
May 3, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart C. Talley on behalf of Joseph Driscoll (Talley, Stuart)
May 1, 2017 Filing 15 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 6 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
April 27, 2017 Filing 14 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered DENYING as MOOT re: (14 in 1:17-cv-10287-IT) Joint MOTION to Stay. See Attached Order. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:17-cv-10287-IT(DaSilva, Carolina)
April 25, 2017 Filing 13 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. CORRECTED MDL Order No. 2 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
April 21, 2017 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 5/16/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (DaSilva, Carolina)
April 21, 2017 Filing 11 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 5 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
April 19, 2017 Filing 10 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 4 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
April 19, 2017 Filing 9 Conditional Transfer order number 1 in MDL 2768 dated 4/17/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
April 14, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Ferrera on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Ferrera, David)
April 14, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nelson G. Apjohn on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Apjohn, Nelson)
April 14, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gene M. Williams on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Williams, Gene)
April 10, 2017 Filing 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Case Management Order No. 3 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
April 10, 2017 Filing 4 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Case Management Order No. 2 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
April 10, 2017 Filing 3 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Case Management Order No. 1 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
April 7, 2017 Filing 2 Transfer order in MDL 2768 dated 4/5/17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Indira Talwani for consolidated pretrial proceedings. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:16-cv-11510-IT, 1:16-cv-12253-IT, 1:17-cv-10057-IT(Jones, Sherry)
April 6, 2017 Filing 1 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Stryker LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Represented By: Gene M. Williams
Represented By: Paul E. Asfendis
Represented By: David L. Ferrera
Represented By: E. James Shepherd
Represented By: Heidi K. Hubbard
Represented By: Gay L. Tedder
Represented By: Neelum J. Wadhwani
Represented By: Nicholas N. Deutsch
Represented By: Madeleine M. McDonough
Represented By: Kim M. Catullo
Represented By: Dawn M. Curry
Represented By: Nelson G. Apjohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Saunders
Represented By: James Robert Bell, III
Represented By: Joseph A. Osborne
Represented By: MICHAEL C. SCHAFLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Loizzo
Represented By: Ahmed S. Diab
Represented By: Jessica S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy Perez
Represented By: Thomas V. Ayala
Represented By: Revital B. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Purtell
Represented By: Joseph A. Osborne
Represented By: MICHAEL C. SCHAFLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camilla Pakela
Represented By: