Jones v. Dolan Connly P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Jones
Defendant: Kathleen M. Allen, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., Linda Orlans, Bank of New York Mellon, Barbara D. Connly, David A. Marsocci, Orlans P.C., Gregory A. Connly, Cindy Silva, Alison Orlans, Dolan Connly P.C., James W. Dolan, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv11076
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of New York Mellon identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York Mellon.. (Carr, Peter)
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp. for Select Portfolio Servicing Inc... (Carr, Peter)
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Bono, Christine)
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 31, 2019 to File Responsive Pleading by Bank of New York Mellon, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc..(Carr, Peter)
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO THE COURT by Paul Jones re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Rivera, Christina)
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time for an additional 10 days to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Paul Jones. (Bartlett, Timothy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed Linda Orlans served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed Orlans P.C. served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 25, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed Alison Orlans served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Dolan Connly P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss 12(b)(6))(Marsocci, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Treating #17 as a Motion to Withdraw, the Motion is GRANTED. (FDS, law1)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #6 Emergency MOTION to Void by Paul Jones. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 Emergency MOTION for a Temporary Restraining Order/ Preliminary Injunction by Paul Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cindy Silva served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Gregory A. Connly served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kathleen M. Allen served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Barbara D. Connly served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bank of New York Mellon served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed James W. Dolan served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dolan Connly P.C. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed David A. Marsocci served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Lindsay, Maurice)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David A. Marsocci, Linda Orlans, James W. Dolan, Cindy Silva, Gregory A. Connly, Alison Orlans, Dolan Connly P.C., Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., John Doe, Bank of New York Mellon, Barbara D. Connly, Orlans P.C., Jane Doe, Kathleen M. Allen, filed by Paul Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-14)(Lindsay, Maurice)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION to Void April 19, 2018 Second Forclosure Sale by Paul Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits (1-3))(Lindsay, Maurice)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 1BST074387 for #1 Complaint, (Coppola, Katelyn)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (McKillop, Matthew)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Paul Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14)(McKillop, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Dolan Connly P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.
Represented By: Peter Francis Carr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Orlans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Peter Francis Carr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara D. Connly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Marsocci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlans P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A. Connly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Orlans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolan Connly P.C.
Represented By: David A Marsocci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?