Mehdi v. Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Heather Mehdi
Defendant: Michael G Kauffman, Scott Garland, Deepa R Pakianathan, Mikael Dolsten, Barry E Greene, Mansoor Raza Mirza, Michael F Falvey, Kenneth E Weg, Sharon Shacham, Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc., Garen G Bohlin and Justin A Renz
Case Number: 1:2019cv11972
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Status Conference set for 10/11/19 10AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein (Caruso, Stephanie)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Andrews, Daryl)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND ELECTRONIC REMINDER TO COUNSEL & NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE: Plaintiff's counsel is reminded that a notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory and a completed form should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. A Status Conference has been set for 10/11/19 10AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein to address this issue. Should counsel file the form prior to the hearing date, the Conference will be cancelled.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC REMINDER TO COUNSEL: A notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory and a completed form should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Regarding Service And Extending Time To Answer Or Otherwise Plead and Proposed Order, by Garen G Bohlin, Mikael Dolsten, Michael F Falvey, Scott Garland, Barry E Greene, Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc., Michael G Kauffman, Mansoor Raza Mirza, Deepa R Pakianathan, Justin A Renz, Sharon Shacham, Kenneth E Weg. (Bongiorno, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc... (Bongiorno, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Bongiorno on behalf of Garen G Bohlin, Mikael Dolsten, Michael F Falvey, Scott Garland, Barry E Greene, Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc., Michael G Kauffman, Mansoor Raza Mirza, Deepa R Pakianathan, Justin A Renz, Sharon Shacham, Kenneth E Weg (Bongiorno, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7881467 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Heather Mehdi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet)(Andrews, Daryl) Modified on 9/17/2019 to fix docket text (Vieira, Leonardo). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/19/2019) to attach correct document (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehdi v. Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G Kauffman
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Garland
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepa R Pakianathan
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikael Dolsten
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry E Greene
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mansoor Raza Mirza
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F Falvey
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth E Weg
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Shacham
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garen G Bohlin
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin A Renz
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Mehdi
Represented By: Daryl DeValerio Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?