Thomas v. Spaulding et al
Plaintiff: Derek Thomas
Defendant: Scott Murray, Corey Pointer, Stephen Spaulding, Joslyn, Erin Conner, Jaime Baker, Jacqueline Carmichael, Taylor Sia, Daniel Quist, Cook, Paul Anderson, Ruze, John Doe 3, M Worthington, Kimo Elrahed, Gabriel Dezayas, C Norris, K Fricker, Morley, John Doe 2, Jessie Bell, John Doe 4 and John Doe 1
Case Number: 1:2019cv11982
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Referring Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 25 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #24 Motion to Appoint Counsel due to being a duplicate of document #11 . (Finn, Mary)
November 7, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Derek Thomas.(Finn, Mary)
November 7, 2019 Filing 23 Letter/request (non-motion) from Derek Thomas re: inability to prosecute case due to Spaulding's obstructions filed. (Finn, Mary)
November 5, 2019 Filing 22 Letter/request (non-motion) from Derek Thomas re: failure of facility - Spaulding to forward USMS Marshals Service Forms to him.. (Clerk's Office has sent the Plaintiff these forms on 10/22/2019). (Finn, Mary)
November 4, 2019 Filing 21 Copy re 20 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, mailed to Derek Thomas on 11/4/19. (Lima, Christine)
November 4, 2019 Filing 20 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson Referred for: Events Only (e). Motions referred: #11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Lima, Christine) Motions referred to Katherine A. Robertson.
October 30, 2019 Filing 19 Copy re 18 Notice of Case Assignment, mailed to Derek Thomas, #08564-082, DEVENS FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 879, AYER, MA 01432 on 10/30/2019. (Finn, Mary)
October 30, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Derek Thomas.(Finn, Mary)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 Letter/request (non-motion) from Derek Thomas not receiving form requested - USMS Forms.. (Finn, Mary)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 Letter/request (non-motion) from Derek Thomas re: USMS Forms, new mail policy by Stephen Spaulding at FMC Devens. (Finn, Mary)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 Remark - 19 Blank Marshals Forms forwarded to the Pltf. today - John Does 1 - 4 not to be served - see Order entered on 10/10/2019. (Finn, Mary)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 Letter/request (non-motion) from Derek Thomas re: missing Marshals Service Form on package sent on 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope from Derek Thomas with letter attached)(Finn, Mary)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 Letter/request (non-motion) from Derek Thomas re: requesting Marshals Service Forms - Forms not included in package sent on 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Inmates)(Finn, Mary)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Derek Thomas.(Finn, Mary) Modified on 10/21/2019 to correct the filing date. (Finn, Mary).
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Copy re #9 Notice (Other) mailed to Derek Thomas, #08564-082, DEVENS FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 879, AYER, MA 01432 on 10/10/2019. (Finn, Mary)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to Plaintiff re: service on the Defendants and paperwork needed by the Marshals for Service; cc/Pltf. Thomas this date. (Finn, Mary)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Copy re #7 Summons Issued, mailed to Derek Thomas, #08564-082, DEVENS FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER, Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 879, AYER, MA 01432 on 10/10/2019. (Finn, Mary)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Paul Anderson, Jaime Baker, Jessie Bell, Jacqueline Carmichael, Erin Conner, Cook, Gabriel Dezayas, Kimo Elrahed, K Fricker, Joslyn, Morley, Scott Murray, C Norris, Corey Pointer, Daniel Quist, Ruze, Taylor Sia, Stephen Spaulding, M Worthington and forwarded to the Plaintiff for Service. (Finn, Mary)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Copy re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, #5 Notice - re payment of fee (prisoner filer) mailed to Derek A. Thomas, #08564-082 on 10/10/2019. (Finn, Mary)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at FMC Devens Medical Center, Treasurer's Department, P.O. Box 879, Devens, MA 10432; cc.Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), the Court assesses an initial filing fee of $39.83. The remainder of the fee, $310.17, shall be collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The Clerk shall issue summons to all Defendants, except John Doe 1 through 4. Notwithstanding Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m)) and L.R, 4.1, Plainfiff, Derek A. Thomas will have 90 days from date of this Order to effect service; cc/Plaintiff. Modified on 10/10/2019 to correct a typo - 1 through 3 to 1 through 4. (Finn, Mary). (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/10/2019 with correct Order) (Finn, Mary). Modified on 10/10/2019 (Finn, Mary).
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derek Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Castilla, Francis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #2 Affidavit supporting IFP) (Castilla, Francis).
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Derek Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/19/2019) (Castilla, Francis).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Spaulding et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joslyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Sia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Quist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Worthington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimo Elrahed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Dezayas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Fricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?