Turner et al v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Sally Turner and Donald Turner, Jr.
Defendant: Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Dunham-Bush, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as Successor by Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Harsco Corporation f/k/a The Patterson-Kelley Co., Inc., Cooper US, Inc. f/k/a Cooper Industries, LLC, Bayer Cropscience, Inc. as Successor to AMCHEM, Inc., Grinnell LLC, Twin Disc, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Ford Motor Company, Electro Dynamic Corporation, Crane Co., The Gorman-Rupp Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corproation as Successor to EIS Automotive Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Flowserve US, Inc. as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Co., Edward Valves, Inc. and Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Yuba Heat Transfer LLC, A.W. Chesterton Company, General Electric Company, Standard Motor Products, Inc. as Successor to EIS Automotive Corporation, Hampden Automotive Sales Corp., Cooper Industries, LLC, API Heat Transfer Inc. a/k/a API Heat Transfer Electric Heater Company, Taco, Inc., CBS Corporation f/k/a VIACOM, Inc. Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, NIBCO, Inc., Food Machinery and Chemical Corporation d/b/a FMC Corporation, York International Corporation, Dana Corporation, Marotta Controls, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc., Individually and as Successor to Peerless Pump Co., Ross Heat Exchanger Division of American Standard, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Process Engineering and Machine Co., Inc., Pneumo- Abex Corporation as Successor in Interest to Abex Corporation, Elliot Company, Grundfos Water Utility, Inc. f/k/a Yeomans Chicago Corporation, Borg-Warner Corporation by its Successor in Interest Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc., Marshall Engineered Products Company, LLC, Carrier Corporation a/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc., Electrolux Home Products, Inc. f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc. f/k/a Copes-Vulcan, Inc. and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company, Eckel Industries, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Crane Co., as Successor to Cochrane Corp., Aurora Pump Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Roth Pump Company, Honeywell International Inc. f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc. f/k/a Bendix Corporation, VIAD Corp. as Successor to Griscom Russell, ITT Corporation as Successor to Bell & Gossett, Hoffman Pumps, Kennedy Valves, and McDonnell & Miller, FMC f/k/a Northern Pump and Peerless Pump Co., Quaker Chemical Corporation, Hennessy Industries, LLC f/k/a Hennessy Industries, Inc. as Successor to AMMCO Tools Inc., Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. f/k/a Jamesbury Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, API Heat Transfer Inc., Carrier Corporation, Honeywell International Inc., Cooper US, Inc., Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Flowserve US, Inc., Viad Corp., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CBS Corporation, Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Borg-Warner Corporation, Food Machinery and Chemical Corporation, FMC, Grundfos Water Utility, Inc., Harsco Corporation, Pneumo-Abex Corporation, Neles-Jamesbury, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Bryant Heating, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, ITT Corporation, Standard Motor Products, Inc., API Heat Transfer Electric Heater Company and Hennessy Industries, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv12456
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 186 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carrier Corporation. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 26, 2020 Filing 185 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Carrier Corporation. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 20, 2020 Filing 184 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harsco Corporation. (Van Baars, Alexandra)
February 20, 2020 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Van Baars on behalf of Harsco Corporation (Van Baars, Alexandra)
February 20, 2020 Filing 182 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Lancer, Michaela)
February 20, 2020 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaela E. Lancer on behalf of Harsco Corporation (Lancer, Michaela)
February 12, 2020 Filing 180 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment of the Magistrate Judge. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
February 10, 2020 Filing 179 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 2/10/2020. Court reviews 906 Agenda with counsel. Further date set. (Status Conference set for 4/6/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler.). (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Landry, McCann, Armado, Jackson, et al) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11532-RWZ et al.(Putnam, Harold)
February 10, 2020 Filing 178 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #163 Motion to Transfer Case to Asbestos Docket. (Putnam, Harold)
February 7, 2020 Filing 177 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 for Gardner Denver, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 7, 2020 Filing 176 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 6, 2020 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc. (Watts, Clint)
February 6, 2020 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of FMC (Watts, Clint)
February 6, 2020 Filing 173 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc..(Dwyer, Paul)
February 6, 2020 Filing 172 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC.(Dwyer, Paul)
February 6, 2020 Filing 171 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc.. (Dwyer, Paul)
February 6, 2020 Filing 170 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FMC. (Dwyer, Paul)
February 6, 2020 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc. (Dwyer, Paul)
February 6, 2020 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of FMC (Dwyer, Paul)
February 6, 2020 Filing 167 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Warren Pumps LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 6, 2020 Filing 166 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 for Warren Pumps, LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 6, 2020 Filing 165 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 for Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 6, 2020 Filing 164 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Borg-Warner Corporation. (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 5, 2020 Filing 163 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Asbestos Docket. by Defense Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Armato, Stephen)
February 4, 2020 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn B. Coffin, Jr on behalf of Hennessy Industries, LLC (Coffin, Glenn)
February 4, 2020 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn B. Coffin, Jr on behalf of API Heat Transfer Inc. (Coffin, Glenn)
February 4, 2020 Filing 160 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Marshall Engineered Products Company, LLC.(Egan, John)
February 4, 2020 Filing 159 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marshall Engineered Products Company, LLC. (Egan, John)
February 4, 2020 Filing 158 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fort Kent Holdings, Inc.. (Egan, John)
February 4, 2020 Filing 157 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Egan, John)
February 4, 2020 Filing 156 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Egan, John)
February 3, 2020 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by John Egan on behalf of Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Marshall Engineered Products Company, LLC (Egan, John)
February 3, 2020 Filing 154 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hennessy Industries, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Fortive Corporation for Hennessy Industries, LLC.. (Robinson, John)
February 3, 2020 Filing 153 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Hennessy Industries, LLC.(Robinson, John)
February 3, 2020 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Robinson on behalf of Hennessy Industries, LLC (Robinson, John)
February 3, 2020 Filing 151 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by API Heat Transfer Inc. identifying Corporate Parent API Heat Transfer Holding Co. for API Heat Transfer Inc... (Robinson, John)
February 3, 2020 Filing 150 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by API Heat Transfer Inc..(Robinson, John)
February 3, 2020 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Robinson on behalf of API Heat Transfer Inc. (Robinson, John)
January 31, 2020 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle E. Bjornlund on behalf of Cooper Industries, LLC (Bjornlund, Kyle)
January 31, 2020 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Dana Corporation (Armato, Stephen)
January 31, 2020 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation(as Successor to EIS Automotive Corporation ) (Armato, Stephen)
January 31, 2020 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Standard Motor Products, Inc. (Armato, Stephen)
January 31, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Cooper Industries, LLC (Armato, Stephen)
January 31, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Armato, Stephen)
January 31, 2020 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Pneumo-Abex Corporation(as Successor in Interest to Abex Corporation ) (Armato, Stephen)
January 31, 2020 Filing 141 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dana Corporation. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 140 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parker-Hannifin Corporation(as Successor to EIS Automotive Corporation ). (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 139 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Standard Motor Products, Inc.. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 138 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cooper Industries, LLC. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 137 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Honeywell International Inc.. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 136 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pneumo-Abex Corporation. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Dana Corporation (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation(as Successor to EIS Automotive Corporation ) (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Standard Motor Products, Inc. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Cooper Industries, LLC (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Pneumo-Abex Corporation(as Successor in Interest to Abex Corporation ) (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 129 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Model Answer to All Pending and Future Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cooper Industries, LLC.(Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 128 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Model Answer to All Pending and Future Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Standard Motor Products, Inc..(Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 127 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Model Answer to All Pending and Future Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pneumo-Abex Corporation.(Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 126 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Model Answer to All Pending and Future Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 125 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Model Answer to All Pending and Future Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Dana Corporation.(Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 124 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Model Answer to All Pending and Future Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International Inc..(Cetrulo, Lawrence)
January 31, 2020 Filing 123 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Neles-Jamesbury, Inc.. (Jackson, Susan)
January 31, 2020 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Jackson on behalf of Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. (Jackson, Susan)
January 29, 2020 Filing 121 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Velan Valve Corp.. (Mohan, Catherine)
January 29, 2020 Filing 120 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of NIBCO INC.. (Mohan, Catherine)
January 29, 2020 Filing 119 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
January 29, 2020 Filing 118 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Mohan, Catherine)
January 29, 2020 Filing 117 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by NIBCO, Inc..(Mohan, Catherine)
January 29, 2020 Filing 116 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
January 28, 2020 Filing 115 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CBS Corporation. (Moccia, Anthony)
January 28, 2020 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Moccia on behalf of CBS Corporation (Moccia, Anthony)
January 28, 2020 Filing 113 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Taco, Inc.. (Young, Kevin)
January 28, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Young on behalf of Taco, Inc. (Young, Kevin)
January 20, 2020 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni K. Mackler on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Mackler, Joni)
January 20, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni K. Mackler on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. (Mackler, Joni)
January 20, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Lee on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. (Lee, Michael)
January 20, 2020 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Lee on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Lee, Michael)
January 20, 2020 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Lee on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. (Lee, Michael)
January 20, 2020 Filing 106 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Claflin, Mark)
January 20, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Claflin on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Claflin, Mark)
January 20, 2020 Filing 104 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flowserve US, Inc.. (Claflin, Mark)
January 20, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Claflin on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. (Claflin, Mark)
January 16, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Keough on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Keough, Timothy)
January 15, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander E. Terry on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Terry, Alexander)
January 3, 2020 Filing 100 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) of Defendant Roth Pump Company. (Sexton, James)
January 3, 2020 Filing 99 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roth Pump Company. (Sexton, James)
January 3, 2020 Filing 98 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claim, and Answer to Cross-Claims by Roth Pump Company.(Sexton, James)
January 3, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Sexton on behalf of Roth Pump Company (Sexton, James)
January 3, 2020 Filing 96 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Sexton, James)
January 3, 2020 Filing 95 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (Sexton, James)
January 3, 2020 Filing 94 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claim, and Answer to Cross-Claims by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Sexton, James)
January 3, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Sexton on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Sexton, James)
January 3, 2020 Filing 92 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. Incorrectly Named as Electrolux Home Products, Inc. f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc. f/k/a Copes-Vulcan, Inc. and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company. (DeLuzio, Maria)
January 3, 2020 Filing 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
January 2, 2020 Filing 90 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Twin Disc, Inc.. (Martin, Adam)
January 2, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. Martin on behalf of Twin Disc, Inc. (Martin, Adam)
January 2, 2020 Filing 88 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.. (Martin, Adam)
January 2, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. Martin on behalf of Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. (Martin, Adam)
December 31, 2019 Filing 86 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 31, 2019 Filing 85 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IMO Industries, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 31, 2019 Filing 84 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Grundfos Water Utility, Inc., formerly known as Yeomans Chicago Corporation. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 31, 2019 Filing 83 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grundfos Water Utility, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 27, 2019 Filing 82 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company.(Radke, James)
December 19, 2019 Filing 81 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation.. (George, Wayne)
December 19, 2019 Filing 80 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ITT Corporation identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc. for ITT Corporation.. (George, Wayne)
December 19, 2019 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls plc for Grinnell LLC.. (George, Wayne)
December 19, 2019 Filing 78 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goulds Pumps Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc. for Goulds Pumps Incorporated.. (George, Wayne)
December 19, 2019 Filing 77 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elliot Company identifying Corporate Parent Ebara Corporation, Other Affiliate Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliot Company.. (George, Wayne)
December 19, 2019 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by York International Corporation.(George, Wayne)
December 19, 2019 Filing 75 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ITT Corporation.(George, Wayne)
December 19, 2019 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Grinnell LLC.(George, Wayne)
December 19, 2019 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Goulds Pumps Incorporated.(George, Wayne)
December 19, 2019 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Elliot Company.(George, Wayne)
December 19, 2019 Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hampden Automotive Sales Corp.. (DePalo, Vincent)
December 19, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent DePalo on behalf of Hampden Automotive Sales Corp. (DePalo, Vincent)
December 18, 2019 Filing 69 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company identifying Corporate Parent Corteva, Inc. for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company.. (Radke, James)
December 18, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Radke on behalf of E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company (Radke, James)
December 16, 2019 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A.W. Chesterton Company. (McVinney, Michael)
December 16, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. McVinney on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Company (McVinney, Michael)
December 16, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. McCarthy on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Company (McCarthy, Daniel)
December 16, 2019 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Viad Corp.. (Netburn, Peter)
December 16, 2019 Filing 63 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Viad Corp..(Netburn, Peter)
December 16, 2019 Filing 62 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Viad Corp..(Netburn, Peter)
December 16, 2019 Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Viad Corp..(Netburn, Peter)
December 16, 2019 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(DeLuzio, Maria)
December 16, 2019 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Borg-Warner Corporation.(DeLuzio, Maria)
December 12, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary M. Weisberg on behalf of Electro Dynamic Corporation (Weisberg, Zachary)
December 12, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik C. DiMarco on behalf of Electro Dynamic Corporation (DiMarco, Erik)
December 12, 2019 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Electro Dynamic Corporation. (DiMarco, Erik)
December 12, 2019 Filing 55 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Electro Dynamic Corporation.(DiMarco, Erik)
December 12, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Defense Liaison Counsel (Armato, Stephen)
December 12, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Defense Liaison Counsel (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
December 12, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Netburn on behalf of VIAD Corp. as Successor to Griscom Russell (Netburn, Peter)
December 11, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary M. Weisberg on behalf of General Dynamics Corporation (Weisberg, Zachary)
December 11, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik C. DiMarco on behalf of General Dynamics Corporation (DiMarco, Erik)
December 11, 2019 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Dynamics Corporation.(DiMarco, Erik)
December 11, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Elliot Company, Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Grinnell LLC, ITT Corporation as Successor to Bell & Gossett, Hoffman Pumps, Kennedy Valves, and McDonnell & Miller, York International Corporation (Tayyab, J.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of Elliot Company, Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Grinnell LLC, ITT Corporation as Successor to Bell & Gossett, Hoffman Pumps, Kennedy Valves, and McDonnell & Miller, York International Corporation (George, Wayne)
December 11, 2019 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Yuba Heat Transfer LLC. (Smith, Kaitlin)
December 11, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Yuba Heat Transfer LLC.(Smith, Kaitlin)
December 10, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Perritano, Judith)
December 10, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company (Perritano, Judith)
December 10, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Grundfos Water Utility, Inc. f/k/a Yeomans Chicago Corporation (Perritano, Judith)
December 10, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
December 10, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc. f/k/a Copes-Vulcan, Inc. and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company (Perritano, Judith)
December 10, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Carrier Corporation a/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
December 10, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Borg-Warner Corporation by its Successor in Interest Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
December 10, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Riordan, Meghan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company (Riordan, Meghan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Grundfos Water Utility, Inc. f/k/a Yeomans Chicago Corporation (Riordan, Meghan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc. f/k/a Copes-Vulcan, Inc. and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company (Riordan, Meghan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Carrier Corporation a/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Borg-Warner Corporation by its Successor in Interest Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 10, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Grundfos Water Utility, Inc. f/k/a Yeomans Chicago Corporation (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 10, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 10, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc. f/k/a Copes-Vulcan, Inc. and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Carrier Corporation a/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 10, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Borg-Warner Corporation by its Successor in Interest Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Shannon on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Shannon, Anne)
December 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Shannon on behalf of NIBCO, Inc. (Shannon, Anne)
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Shannon on behalf of General Electric Company (Shannon, Anne)
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Emmanuel, Stesha)
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of NIBCO, Inc. (Emmanuel, Stesha)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of General Electric Company (Emmanuel, Stesha)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Velan Valve Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation.. (Mohan, Catherine)
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NIBCO, Inc.. (Mohan, Catherine)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Mohan, Catherine)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of NIBCO, Inc. (Mohan, Catherine)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.. (Felice, John)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Felice on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Felice, John)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark O. Denehy on behalf of Yuba Heat Transfer LLC (Denehy, Mark)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin K. Smith on behalf of Yuba Heat Transfer LLC (Smith, Kaitlin)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen R. Souza on behalf of Yuba Heat Transfer LLC (Souza, Kristen)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Dynamics Corporation. (DiMarco, Erik)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by General Dynamics Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of No Pending Motions (DiMarco, Erik)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by General Dynamics Corporation. (DiMarco, Erik)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of facts General Dynamics Corporation's Statement in Removed Cases. (DiMarco, Erik)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Dynamics Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7998375 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Category Form)(DiMarco, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner et al v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Kent Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Dunham-Bush, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as Successor by Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harsco Corporation f/k/a The Patterson-Kelley Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper US, Inc. f/k/a Cooper Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc. as Successor to AMCHEM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Disc, Inc.
Represented By: Adam C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Alexander E. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electro Dynamic Corporation
Represented By: Erik C. DiMarco
Represented By: Zachary M. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gorman-Rupp Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corproation as Successor to EIS Automotive Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Lee
Represented By: Mark J. Claflin
Represented By: Joni K. Mackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: James F. Radke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc. as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Co., Edward Valves, Inc. and Nordstrom Valves, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Incorporated
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuba Heat Transfer LLC
Represented By: Mark O. Denehy
Represented By: Kaitlin K. Smith
Represented By: Kristen R. Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Represented By: Michael F. McVinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products, Inc. as Successor to EIS Automotive Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampden Automotive Sales Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: API Heat Transfer Inc. a/k/a API Heat Transfer Electric Heater Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation f/k/a VIACOM, Inc. Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIBCO, Inc.
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Machinery and Chemical Corporation d/b/a FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marotta Controls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc., Individually and as Successor to Peerless Pump Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Heat Exchanger Division of American Standard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Process Engineering and Machine Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo- Abex Corporation as Successor in Interest to Abex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Company
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grundfos Water Utility, Inc. f/k/a Yeomans Chicago Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation by its Successor in Interest Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Engineered Products Company, LLC
Represented By: John Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation a/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc. f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc. f/k/a Copes-Vulcan, Inc. and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckel Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James W. Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co., as Successor to Cochrane Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.
Represented By: Adam C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roth Pump Company
Represented By: James W. Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc. f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc. f/k/a Bendix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD Corp. as Successor to Griscom Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation as Successor to Bell & Gossett, Hoffman Pumps, Kennedy Valves, and McDonnell & Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC f/k/a Northern Pump and Peerless Pump Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quaker Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries, LLC f/k/a Hennessy Industries, Inc. as Successor to AMMCO Tools Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. f/k/a Jamesbury Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Erik C. DiMarco
Represented By: Zachary M. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: API Heat Transfer Inc.
Represented By: Glenn B. Coffin, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Stephen T. Armato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Lee
Represented By: Mark J. Claflin
Represented By: Joni K. Mackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp.
Represented By: Peter C. Netburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Kent Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: John Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Machinery and Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grundfos Water Utility, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harsco Corporation
Represented By: Michaela E. Lancer
Represented By: Alexandra Van Baars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo-Abex Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neles-Jamesbury, Inc.
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: John R. Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Heating
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Stephen T. Armato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: API Heat Transfer Electric Heater Company
Represented By: Glenn B. Coffin, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries, LLC
Represented By: Glenn B. Coffin, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Turner
Represented By: Andrea Marino Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Turner, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Marino Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?