In Re. Correia et al
Trustee: Carolyn A. Bankowski
Appellee: Nathaniel Vasallo
Appellant: Antonio Correia
Case Number: 1:2020cv10304
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On January 31, 2020, the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Massachusetts granted summary judgment against Appellant Antonio Correia after he failed to file an opposition. [ECF No. #1 at 1]. Correia filed a notice of appeal on February 12, 2020, [id. at 3], and had until February 26, 2020 to file a designation of additional papers to be included on the record and a statement of the issues presented, [id. at 7]. He has failed to do so. Appellee Nathaniel Vassallo has consequently moved to dismiss the appeal. [ECF No. #4 ]. Under the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, appellants must "file 'a designation of the items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented' within 14 days of the notice of appeal." In re Cameron, 2018 WL 326458, at *6 (D. Mass. Jan. 4, 2018) (quoting Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a)(1)). "Failure to do so may result in dismissal of the case, in the discretion of the Court." Id. (citing Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(a)(2) ("An appellant's failure to take any step other than the timely filing of a notice of appeal does not affect the validity of the appeal, but is ground only for the district court... to act as it considers appropriate, including dismissing the appeal.")). Appellant is hereby ordered to show cause, in writing by April 20, 2020, why his appeal should not be dismissed for the reasons articulated in Appellee's motion. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Nathaniel Vasallo. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal)(Willis, John)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-01025. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Correia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Carolyn A. Bankowski
Represented By: Carolyn A. Bankowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nathaniel Vasallo
Represented By: John F. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Antonio Correia
Represented By: Carmenelisa Perez-Kudzma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?