John R Wade et al vs. Tri -Wire Employee Stock Option Trust et al
Plaintiff: John R Wade, Taylor Wade, Sharon Wade and John R Wade IV
Defendant: Tri -Wire Employee Stock Option Trust, ROBERT LANDRY, ROBERT R. NEWELL, TRI-WIRE EMPLOYEE STOCK OPTION TRUST, BELLMARK PARTNERS, LLC, RUBEN KLEIN, Robert Gould, SES WINDING UP CORPORATION f/k/a SES ADVISORS, INC., JOHN MARSH, JEANINE PENDERGAST, SCOTT PERRY, CAPITAL TRUSTEES, LLC, LORI WENETTA, SPINNAKER TRUST, SES ESOP STRATEGIES, LLC, as successor to SES ADVISORS, INC., EMPIRE VALUATION CONSULTANTS, LLC, DAVID GESMONDI and SES WINDING UP CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv10523
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 34 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Scott J. Stitt and Chelsea Mikula Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-8236383 by Robert Gould, JEANINE PENDERGAST, SPINNAKER TRUST, TRI-WIRE EMPLOYEE STOCK OPTION TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Carter, Nicholas)
May 6, 2020 Filing 33 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #31 #28 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer BELLMARK PARTNERS, LLC answer due 6/15/2020; CAPITAL TRUSTEES, LLC answer due 6/15/2020; DAVID GESMONDI answer due 6/15/2020. (Russo, Noreen)
May 4, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystle S. Guillory Tadesse on behalf of BELLMARK PARTNERS, LLC, DAVID GESMONDI (Guillory Tadesse, Krystle)
May 4, 2020 Filing 31 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 15, 2020 to File Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint by BELLMARK PARTNERS, LLC, DAVID GESMONDI.(Farside, Joseph)
May 4, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Farside, Jr on behalf of BELLMARK PARTNERS, LLC, DAVID GESMONDI (Farside, Joseph)
April 30, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #28 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 15, 2020 to File Answer by Kenneth B. Walton on behalf of CAPITAL TRUSTEES, LLC. (Walton, Kenneth)
April 30, 2020 Filing 28 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 15, 2020 to File Answer by CAPITAL TRUSTEES, LLC.(Walton, Kenneth)
April 27, 2020 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. Acknowledgement filed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. (Badway, Ernest)
April 27, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. DAVID GESMONDI served on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Sharon Wade; John R Wade; Taylor Wade; John R Wade IV. (Badway, Ernest)
April 23, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. ROBERT R. NEWELL served on 4/1/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Sharon Wade; John R Wade; Taylor Wade; John R Wade IV. (Badway, Ernest)
April 23, 2020 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
April 23, 2020 Filing 23 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 6/15/2020 (Russo, Noreen)
April 22, 2020 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 15, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,,, by Robert Gould, JEANINE PENDERGAST, SPINNAKER TRUST, TRI-WIRE EMPLOYEE STOCK OPTION TRUST.(Carter, Nicholas)
April 16, 2020 Filing 21 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. CAPITAL TRUSTEES, LLC answer due 6/1/2020. (Russo, Noreen)
April 15, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #19 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 1, 2020 to File Answer by Kenneth B. Walton on behalf of CAPITAL TRUSTEES, LLC. (Walton, Kenneth)
April 15, 2020 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 1, 2020 to File Answer by CAPITAL TRUSTEES, LLC.(Walton, Kenneth)
April 15, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. TRI-WIRE EMPLOYEE STOCK OPTION TRUST served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Sharon Wade; John R Wade; Taylor Wade; John R Wade IV. (Badway, Ernest)
April 15, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. BELLMARK PARTNERS, LLC served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Sharon Wade; John R Wade; Taylor Wade; John R Wade IV. (Badway, Ernest)
April 15, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. Acknowledgement filed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. (Badway, Ernest)
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. Robert Gould served on 4/2/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Sharon Wade; John R Wade; Taylor Wade; John R Wade IV. (Badway, Ernest)
April 15, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. Acknowledgement filed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. (Badway, Ernest)
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. CAPITAL TRUSTEES, LLC served on 4/1/2020, answer due 4/22/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Sharon Wade; John R Wade; Taylor Wade; John R Wade IV. (Badway, Ernest)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. LORI WENETTA waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Badway, Ernest)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. SPINNAKER TRUST waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Badway, Ernest)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. SCOTT PERRY waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Badway, Ernest)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. JEANINE PENDERGAST waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Badway, Ernest)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. ROBERT R. NEWELL waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Badway, Ernest)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. JOHN MARSH waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Badway, Ernest)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. ROBERT LANDRY waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Badway, Ernest)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. RUBEN KLEIN waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Badway, Ernest)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Wade, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, John R Wade IV. Robert Gould waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Badway, Ernest)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against Tri-Wire Employee Stock Option Trust, et al. against All Plaintiffs Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8156551 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John R Wade IV, John R Wade, Taylor Wade, Sharon Wade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Badway, Ernest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John R Wade et al vs. Tri -Wire Employee Stock Option Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri -Wire Employee Stock Option Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT LANDRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT R. NEWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRI-WIRE EMPLOYEE STOCK OPTION TRUST
Represented By: Nicholas B Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELLMARK PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle S. Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUBEN KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gould
Represented By: Nicholas B Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SES WINDING UP CORPORATION f/k/a SES ADVISORS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MARSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANINE PENDERGAST
Represented By: Nicholas B Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL TRUSTEES, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth B. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI WENETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPINNAKER TRUST
Represented By: Nicholas B Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SES ESOP STRATEGIES, LLC, as successor to SES ADVISORS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMPIRE VALUATION CONSULTANTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID GESMONDI
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Represented By: Krystle S. Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SES WINDING UP CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R Wade
Represented By: Ernest E. Badway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Wade
Represented By: Ernest E. Badway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Wade
Represented By: Ernest E. Badway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R Wade IV
Represented By: Ernest E. Badway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?