Harnois v. Massachusetts Institute of Technology et al
Plaintiff: Pro Se Party John L. Harnois
Defendant: Liberty Schilpp, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Laela Sayigh, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore and Ashley Weston
Interested Party: Deborah Majewski, Cynthia Cummings, Gavin Fay, Mark Fuller, John Buck and David Gomes
Case Number: 1:2021cv10236
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Referring Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE by John L. Harnois re 36 Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, Notice to Amend Complaint per Rule 15(a)(1)(B) (Harnois, John)
April 9, 2021 Filing 43 DECLARATION re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore, Laela Sayigh, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Murray, Michael)
April 9, 2021 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore, Laela Sayigh, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution. (Braceras, Roberto)
April 9, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore, Laela Sayigh, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution.(Braceras, Roberto)
April 9, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE by John L. Harnois re #32 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Deadlines Related to Subpoenas Duces Tecum, #33 Memorandum in Support of Motion, of withdrawal of discovery requests and initial disclosures (Harnois, John)
April 7, 2021 Filing 39 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) by Liberty Schilpp, Ashley Weston. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Christopher Markey, #2 Exhibit List of Litigation, #3 Certificate of Service)(Markey, Christopher)
April 5, 2021 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC NOTICE: Scheduling Conference & Motion Hearing regarding pending motions #30 , #32 set 5/3/2021 02:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 5, 2021 Filing 37 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion to Change Due Dates to Respond or Answer for Defendants Ashley Weston and Liberty Schilpp #28 . Plaintiff asserts that he mailed notice of the lawsuit and waiver forms to Defendants Weston and Schilpp on February 13, 2021; that on February 26, 2021, he was advised by Attorney Markey that Attorney Markey represented Defendants Schilpp and Weston and would waive service on behalf of his clients; that on March 16, 2021, Plaintiff conducted a Rule 26(f) conference with counsel but objected to Attorney Markey's participation because Attorney Markey had not returned the waiver of service forms; and that later on that same date, Attorney Markey filed executed waiver of service forms. Mem. 1-2 #29 . Plaintiff reports further that on March 17, 2021, he nonetheless paid a New Bedford Sheriff to serve Markey on behalf of his clients. Id. at 3. Plaintiff now asks the court "to change the due dates to respond or answer per Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 for Defendants Liberty Schilpp and Ashley Weston from April 19, 2019 [sic] to April 7, 2021." Id. at 1. He also asks the court to sanction Defendants $71.93 per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(d)(2). Id.Given that Defendants did not file the waiver of service on March 15, 2021, Plaintiff was entitled to serve a subpoena with a response date 21 days thereafter. Accordingly, Defendants' time to file a responsive pleading is April 7, 2021. In light of Defendants' filing of the waiver on March 16, 2021, however, the court will grant an extension of the April 7, 2021 deadline if Defendants so request.Plaintiff's request for the cost of service, however, is DENIED, for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 1. That Rule requires all parties to employ the rules of civil procedure "to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding." Plaintiff's actions in hiring a Sheriff to serve the subpoenas after the waiver forms were filed and burdening the court with this motion violate Rule 1. Further violations of Rule 1 are subject to sanctions. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 5, 2021 Filing 36 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER regarding Defendants' Motion for Protective Order to Stay Discovery Pending Disposition of Motions to Dismiss #30 and University Personnel's Motion for Protective Order Staying Deadlines #32 . Plaintiff shall file any opposition to the motions no later than April 16, 2021. All discovery in this litigation, including initial disclosures, is stayed pending further order of the court. All deadlines for responding or objecting to subpoenas deuces tecum and for filing motions to quash or modify are stayed pending further order of the court. The clerk shall reset the 4/26/2021 scheduling conference together with a hearing on the pending motions #30 , #32 . (Kelly, Danielle)
April 5, 2021 Filing 35 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: At the upcoming scheduling conference, the court will set case deadlines, including for initial disclosures and completion of fact discovery. Although parties may serve initial disclosures and requests for written discovery in advance of such deadlines, no responses shall be due until the later of: (a) 30 days after the party requesting discovery has served initial disclosures; or (b) 30 days after the deadline set by the court for initial disclosures. No notices of depositions shall be served prior to the scheduling conference. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 5, 2021 Filing 34 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: A scheduling conference having now been set for April 26, 2021, Plaintiff's Motion for a Hearing #22 is denied as moot. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 2, 2021 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support re #32 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Deadlines Related to Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by John Buck, Cynthia Cummings, Gavin Fay, Mark Fuller, David Gomes, Deborah Majewski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Mark)
April 2, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Deadlines Related to Subpoenas Duces Tecum by Mark Fuller, Cynthia Cummings, Deborah Majewski, David Gomes, Gavin Fay, John Buck.(Johnson, Mark)
March 30, 2021 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION to Stay for Protective Order to Stay Discovery Pending Disposition of Motions to Dismiss filed by Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore, Laela Sayigh, Liberty Schilpp, Ashley Weston, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Braceras, Roberto)
March 30, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Stay for Protective Order to Stay Discovery Pending Disposition of Motions to Dismiss by Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore, Laela Sayigh, Liberty Schilpp, Ashley Weston, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution.(Braceras, Roberto)
March 18, 2021 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION to Compel Def. Weston and Schilpp to respond by April 7, 21 filed by John L. Harnois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Notice of Suit Form, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Notice of Suit Form)(Harnois, John)
March 18, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Compel Def. Weston and Schilpp to respond by April 7, 21 by John L. Harnois.(Harnois, John)
March 18, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. SEE Notice attached. Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2021 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani. This conference will be conducted by video conference. Parties of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(MacDonald, Gail)
March 18, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed Liberty Schilpp served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021; Ashley Weston served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. (Harnois, John)
March 16, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John L. Harnois. Ashley Weston waiver sent on 2/13/2021, answer due 4/14/2021; Liberty Schilpp waiver sent on 2/13/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. (Markey, Christopher) Modified on 3/17/2021: Corrected sent & answer date (Kelly, Danielle).
March 16, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Markey on behalf of Liberty Schilpp, Ashley Weston (Markey, Christopher)
March 16, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION for Hearing L.R. 16.3 Hearing filed by John L. Harnois. (Harnois, John)
March 16, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Hearing L.R. 16.3 Hearing by John L. Harnois.(Harnois, John)
March 15, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by John L. Harnois (Harnois, John)
March 11, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Tucker David DeVoe on behalf of Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore, Laela Sayigh, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution (DeVoe, Tucker)
March 11, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Murray on behalf of Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore, Laela Sayigh, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution (Murray, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution. (Braceras, Roberto)
March 11, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto M. Braceras on behalf of Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore, Laela Sayigh, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution (Braceras, Roberto)
March 9, 2021 Filing 16 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore, Laela Sayigh, & Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution answers due April 9, 2021. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 8, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 9, 2021 to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Unopposed) by Alessandro Bocconcelli, Michael Moore, Laela Sayigh, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution.(Braceras, Roberto)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Alessandro Bocconcelli served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael Moore served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Laela Sayigh served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (Kelly, Danielle)
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendant Massachusetts Institute of Technology by John L. Harnois. (Kelly, Danielle)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Massachusetts Institute of Technology served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kelly, Danielle)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 Filing fee/payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 1BST083826 for #1 Complaint,, (Barbosa, Nilsa)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #2 Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se. The court grants permission on the condition that the plaintiff satisfies all applicable training and other requirements for pro se litigants as stated in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Page 5. The plaintiff is directed to complete the registration form accessible at https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/ecfreg.html (Kelly, Danielle)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Indira Talwani added. Judge Richard G. Stearns no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiff John Harnois has filed this case as related to 19-10705, another lawsuit previously litigated before Judge Stearns. A case qualifies as related only if "some or all of the parties are the same and if one or more of the following similarities exist also: the cases involve the same or similar claims or defenses; or the cases involve the same property, transaction or event; or the cases involve insurance coverage for the same property, transaction or event; or the cases involve substantially the same questions of fact and law. In addition, two cases, one criminal and one civil, are related if the civil case involves forfeiture of property from a transaction or event which is the subject of a previously filed criminal case, or the civil case seeks enforcement of a restitution order or fine imposed in a previously filed criminal case. This rule shall not apply if more than two years have elapsed since the closing of the previous action." D. Mass. L.R. 40.1 (related civil cases). In fact none of the parties in these two actions are the same, nor are the claims. Accordingly, this case must be redrawn in compliance with L.R. 40.1.(mkz)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by John L. Harnois.(McDonagh, Christina)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alessandro Bocconcelli, Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, Liberty Schilpp, Massachusetts Institute of Technology , Ashley Weston, Laela Sayigh, Michael Moore, filed by John L. Harnois. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Alessandro Bocconcelli, #2 Proposed Summons Ashley Weston, #3 Proposed Summons Laela Sayigh, #4 Proposed Summons Liberty Schlipp, #5 Proposed Summons Michael Moore, #6 Proposed Summons MIT, #7 Proposed Summons Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Form)(McDonagh, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harnois v. Massachusetts Institute of Technology et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Schilpp
Represented By: Christopher M. Markey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Institute of Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laela Sayigh
Represented By: Michael K. Murray
Represented By: Tucker David DeVoe
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woods Hole Oceanographic Institution
Represented By: Michael K. Murray
Represented By: Tucker David DeVoe
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessandro Bocconcelli
Represented By: Michael K. Murray
Represented By: Tucker David DeVoe
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Moore
Represented By: Michael K. Murray
Represented By: Tucker David DeVoe
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Weston
Represented By: Christopher M. Markey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Se Party John L. Harnois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Deborah Majewski
Represented By: Mark A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Cynthia Cummings
Represented By: Mark A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Gavin Fay
Represented By: Mark A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mark Fuller
Represented By: Mark A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John Buck
Represented By: Mark A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: David Gomes
Represented By: Mark A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?