Noel et al v. Cronan et al
Plaintiff: Arnold A Noel, Arnold G Noel, Jr., Bartley M. Noel and Arnold Noel
Defendant: Paul M Cronan, Barthine Romelus, Brailey Newton, Ryan M Cunningham, Esq, Bank Of America, Quicken Loans, Commonwealth, Office of the Attorney General, Office of District Attorney, US. Marshall Department, John Doe Francine, John Doe Pompeo Tony, John Doe ( Irish Man), John Doe ( Portuguese Man), John Doe ( US. Marshall), John Doe ( US Marshall), Hawaiian Telcom, John V Rodriguez, John J. Rodrigues, Giavanna Rodrigues, Cori Tindel, Monte P. Dawnson, Christopher L Desousa, Kathleen A Reagan, Freeman Mathias and Gary LLP, Flynn, Wirkus, Young, PC, A Neil Hartzel, Esq, Ryan Giggi, Esq, Northeast Health Services and Kelly Krugel
Case Number: 1:2023cv12299
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 27 USCA Case Number 23-2058 for #25 Notice of Appeal, filed by Arnold Noel. (Paine, Matthew)
December 8, 2023 Filing 26 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #25 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
December 7, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #23 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #24 Order Dismissing Case by Arnold Noel NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 12/27/2023. (Dore, Samantha) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2023: #1 Attachment) (Dore, Samantha).
December 1, 2023 Filing 24 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Dore, Samantha)
December 1, 2023 Filing 23 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER (Dore, Samantha)
November 20, 2023 Filing 22 Motion for Change of Address by Arnold Noel (Dore, Samantha) Modified on 11/22/2023: Updated docketing event (Dore, Samantha).
November 20, 2023 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Arnold Noel.(Dore, Samantha)
November 15, 2023 Filing 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Arnold Noel. (Dore, Samantha)
November 3, 2023 Filing 19 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re #15 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Defendant is also requesting ex-parte consideration in Deciding this Motion & For Attorney's Fees and Costs against the Plaintiff for Filing such a Frivolous Complaint. The Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 15) is DENIED as MOOT, and the requests for ex parte consideration and fees are DENIED, for the reasons expressed in the Court's October 31, 2023 Order (Doc. No. #13 ). (Dore, Samantha)
November 2, 2023 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT by Barthine Romelus. (Attachments: #1 Judgement of Divorce Nisi)(Dore, Samantha)
November 2, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT by Brailey Newton. (Attachments: #1 Judgement of Divorce Nisi)(Dore, Samantha)
November 2, 2023 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. filed by Barthine Romelus. (Attachments: #1 Judgement of Divorce Nisi)(Dore, Samantha) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2023: #2 Exhibit) (Dore, Samantha).
November 2, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Defendant is also requesting ex-parte consideration in Deciding this Motion & For Attorney's Fees and Costs against the Plaintiff for Filing such a Frivolous Complaint by Barthine Romelus.(Dore, Samantha)
October 31, 2023 Filing 14 Set Deadlines: Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint due by 11/21/2023 (Dore, Samantha)
October 31, 2023 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER (Dore, Samantha)
October 26, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Arnold Noel. (Dore, Samantha)
October 24, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Barthine Romelus by Brailey Newton. (Attachments: #1 Judgement of Divorce Nisi) (Dore, Samantha)
October 24, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Defendant Brailey Newton by Brailey Newton. (Attachments: #1 Judgement of Divorce Nisi) (Dore, Samantha)
October 24, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Brailey Newton. (Attachments: #1 Judgement of Divorce Nisi)(Dore, Samantha) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2023: #2 Cover Letter, #3 Attachment to Letter) (Dore, Samantha).
October 24, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Defendant is also requesting ex-parte consideration in Deciding this Motion & For Attorney's Fees and Costs against the Plaintiff for Filing such a Frivolous Complaint by Brailey Newton. (Dore, Samantha)
October 13, 2023 Filing 7 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Dore, Samantha)
October 6, 2023 Filing 6 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Yesterday, on October 5, 2023, Plaintiffs Arnold G. Noel, Jr. et al. (Noel) filed a complaint against Judge Paul M. Cronan and approximately thirty-two other individuals and entities including Bank of America, Quicken Loans, the Office of the Attorney General, the Office of Attorney General, numerous attorneys, and several John Doe members of the clerks office and U.S. Marshals Service. D. 1 at 6-7. He asserts claims for constitutional violations, unlawful practices and violation of parental rights. Id. at 38-39. For relief, he seeks to get DCF False report off his record of neglect and for the 15 day clause that DCF violated be reverse[d] on their investigation that never took place properly, and [for] violating his rights. Id. at 39. This complaint has not yet been served on any of the Defendants. Today, October 6, 2023, Noel moved for the entry of a temporary restraining order. D. 5. It appears that he has been unable to return to his home and has been summonsed to appear for a contempt proceeding on October 30, 2023. Id. at 3. Although the scope of relief that he seeks is not entirely clear, it appears that he is seeking to enjoin his removal from his residence. Id. at 2. Injunctive relief "is an 'extraordinary and drastic remedy.'" Voice of the Arab World, Inc. v. MDTV Med. News Now, Inc., 645 F.3d 26, 32 (1st Cir. 2011) (quoting Munaf v. Geren, 553 U.S. 674, 68990 (2008)). To obtain such relief, the Court must consider: (1) the movant's likelihood of success on the merits; (2) the likelihood of the movant suffering irreparable harm in the absence of injunctive relief; (3) the balance of equities between the parties; and (4) whether granting the injunction is in the public interest. Corp. Techs., Inc. v. Harnett, 731 F.3d 6, 9 (1st Cir. 2013). Plaintiffs "bear the burden of establishing that these four factors weigh in [their] favor." Esso Standard Oil Co. (P.R.) v. Monroig-Zayas, 445 F.3d 13, 18 (1st Cir. 2006) (citation omitted). The likelihood of success on the merits is the main bearing wall of the four-factor framework, Ross-Simons of Warwick, Inc. v. Baccarat, Inc., 102 F.3d 12, 15 (1
October 6, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Arnold A Noel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dore, Samantha)
October 6, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis)
October 6, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee/payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 100004963 for #1 Complaint, (Phillips, Sophie)
October 6, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Cowan, Nicole)
October 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Arnold G Noel, Jr, Arnold A Noel, Bartley M. Noel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noel et al v. Cronan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold A Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold G Noel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartley M. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M Cronan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barthine Romelus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brailey Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan M Cunningham, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US. Marshall Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Francine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Pompeo Tony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe ( Irish Man)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe ( Portuguese Man)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe ( US. Marshall)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe ( US Marshall)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Telcom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John V Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giavanna Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cori Tindel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monte P. Dawnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher L Desousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen A Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Mathias and Gary LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flynn, Wirkus, Young, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Neil Hartzel, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Giggi, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Krugel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?