Lebron et al v. Trombley et al
Plaintiff: Edith Padro Lebron and Carlos Santana
Defendant: Paul Anderson, Robert P. Bohl, Alfred Burgos, Donald P. Brown, Julio Toledo, Mark D. Templeman, William H. Lopes, Christopher B. Bates, Liam R. Jones, Michael Trombley, City of Springfield, John 1-4 Does and Lou P. Weir
Case Number: 3:2020cv30199
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Day on behalf of Paul Anderson (Day, Thomas)
February 5, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Day on behalf of Lou P. Weir (Day, Thomas)
February 4, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Santana, Edith Padro Lebron. Donald P. Brown waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Scott, Robert)
February 4, 2021 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Santana, Edith Padro Lebron. William H. Lopes waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Scott, Robert)
February 4, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Santana, Edith Padro Lebron. Lou P. Weir waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Scott, Robert)
February 4, 2021 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Santana, Edith Padro Lebron. Paul Anderson waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Scott, Robert)
January 29, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Liam R. Jones.(Galvez, Lorena)
January 22, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Santana, Edith Padro Lebron. Liam R. Jones waiver sent on 1/22/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. (Pineiro, Hector)
January 22, 2021 Filing 26 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting Defendant Liam Jones' Assented to #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Amended Complaint filed in State Court. Liam R. Jones' answer due 3/5/2021. (Finn, Mary)
January 21, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Santana, Edith Padro Lebron. Christopher B. Bates waiver sent on 1/19/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Pineiro, Hector)
January 21, 2021 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/05/2021 to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Liam R. Jones.(Galvez, Lorena)
January 21, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Mark Templeman. (Joyce, Austin)
January 15, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Santana, Edith Padro Lebron. Alfred Burgos waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Pineiro, Hector)
January 14, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Santana, Edith Padro Lebron. Michael Trombley waiver sent on 1/14/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Pineiro, Hector)
January 14, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Kittredge on behalf of Liam R. Jones (Kittredge, Joseph)
January 14, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorena Galvez on behalf of Liam R. Jones (Galvez, Lorena)
January 14, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Santana, Edith Padro Lebron. Mark D. Templeman waiver sent on 1/13/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Pineiro, Hector)
January 14, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Santana, Edith Padro Lebron. Julio Toledo waiver sent on 1/13/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Pineiro, Hector)
January 14, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin M. Joyce on behalf of Mark D. Templeman, Julio Toledo (Joyce, Austin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Schmidt on behalf of Mark D. Templeman (Schmidt, Robert)
January 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Saint Laurent on behalf of Robert P. Bohl (Saint Laurent, Jeremy)
January 5, 2021 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting, for good cause pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), the Plaintiffs' #11 Motion to Extend Time to 2/6/2021 for the Plaintiffs to Make Service on the Defendants. (Finn, Mary)
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting Defendant Michael Trombley's Assented to #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint filed in State Court. Michael Trombley's answer due 3/5/2021. (Finn, Mary)
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/6/2021 to complete service of process by Edith Padro Lebron, Carlos Santana. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Docket, Hampden Superior Court Civil Action No. 00529)(Scott, Robert)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 5, 2021 to File Answer by Joseph G. Donnellan on behalf of Michael Trombley. (Donnellan, Joseph)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 5, 2021 to File Answer by Michael Trombley.(Donnellan, Joseph)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Santana, Edith Padro Lebron. City of Springfield waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Pineiro, Hector)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector E. Pineiro on behalf of Edith Padro Lebron, Carlos Santana (Pineiro, Hector)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G. Donnellan on behalf of Michael Trombley (Donnellan, Joseph)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 Remark: A Certified copy of the Notice of Removal has been emailed today to Defendants Counsel for service on the State Court in order to obtain the certified State Court record. (Lindsay, Maurice)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa C. deSousa on behalf of City of Springfield (deSousa, Lisa)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Saint Laurent on behalf of City of Springfield (Saint Laurent, Jeremy)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Trombley ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8573778 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Form)(Donnellan, Joseph) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/31/2020) (Lindsay, Maurice).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lebron et al v. Trombley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Anderson
Represented By: Thomas E. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P. Bohl
Represented By: Jeremy Saint Laurent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Burgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Toledo
Represented By: Austin M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Templeman
Represented By: Austin M. Joyce
Represented By: Robert A. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Lopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher B. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liam R. Jones
Represented By: Lorena Galvez
Represented By: Joseph P. Kittredge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Trombley
Represented By: Joseph G. Donnellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Springfield
Represented By: Jeremy Saint Laurent
Represented By: Lisa C. deSousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-4 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou P. Weir
Represented By: Thomas E. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Padro Lebron
Represented By: Hector E. Pineiro
Represented By: Robert A. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Santana
Represented By: Hector E. Pineiro
Represented By: Robert A. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?