Jane Doe 1 et al v. City of Holyoke et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1, AD, as Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 2, JM, As Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 3 and LB as Mother & Next Friend Minor Jane Doe 4
Defendant: City of Holyoke, Holyoke Public Schools, Anthony Soto, Alberto Vazquez Matos, Stephen Zrike Jr., Lori McKenna and Stephen Mahoney
Case Number: 3:2022cv11701
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2023 Filing 47 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Hampden Courtroom (In person only) before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. (Figueroa, Tamara)
September 5, 2023 Filing 46 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: Electronic Order entered. The hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss ( #27 , #29 , and #33 ) will be held at 10:00 AM on 10/18/2023 in Hampden Courtroom. (Figueroa, Tamara)
June 29, 2023 Filing 45 First MEMORANDUM in Support re #33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Holyoke. (Degnan, Kathleen)
June 29, 2023 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Holyoke Public Schools, Stephen Mahoney, Lori McKenna. (Kelly, Paul)
June 23, 2023 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and on other grounds filed by Anthony Soto, Alberto Vazquez Matos, Stephen Zrike Jr.. (Dulles, Aaron)
June 12, 2023 Filing 42 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #41 Defendants' Assented-to Motion for Leave to File Reply Memoranda in Support of Motions to Dismiss. Defendants shall file their reply, not to exceed five (5) pages, on or before 6/30/2023. (Zamorski, Michael)
June 9, 2023 Filing 41 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply for All Defendants by Holyoke Public Schools, Stephen Mahoney, Lori McKenna.(Kelly, Paul)
May 26, 2023 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and on other grounds, #33 MOTION to Dismiss, #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by AD, as Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 2, JM, As Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 1, LB as Mother & Next Friend Minor Jane Doe 4. (Weaver, Michaela)
May 10, 2023 Filing 39 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: Electronic Order entered granting #38 Plaintiffs' Partially Assented-to Motion to Extend the Time to File a Responsive Pleading to the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' responses to Defendants' respective Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. Nos. #27 , #29 , & #33 ) shall now be filed on or before May 26, 2023.(Zamorski, Michael)
May 9, 2023 Filing 38 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/26/2023 to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and on other grounds, #33 MOTION to Dismiss, #27 MOTION to Dismiss by AD, as Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 2, JM, As Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 1, LB as Mother & Next Friend Minor Jane Doe 4.(Weaver, Michaela)
April 3, 2023 Filing 37 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: Electronic Order entered granting #36 Plaintiffs' Assented-to Motion to Extend the Time to File a Responsive Pleading to the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' responses to Defendants' respective Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. Nos. #27 , #29 , & #33 ) shall now be filed on or before May 12, 2023. (Zamorski, Michael)
March 31, 2023 Filing 36 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/12/2023 to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and on other grounds, #33 MOTION to Dismiss, #27 MOTION to Dismiss by AD, as Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 2, JM, As Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 1, LB as Mother & Next Friend Minor Jane Doe 4.(Weaver, Michaela)
March 30, 2023 Filing 35 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jessica L. Draper. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Figueroa, Tamara)
March 24, 2023 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support re #33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Holyoke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Figueroa, Tamara)
March 24, 2023 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Holyoke. (Figueroa, Tamara)
March 24, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen E. Degnan on behalf of City of Holyoke. (Figueroa, Tamara)
March 24, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne A. Liddy on behalf of City of Holyoke. (Figueroa, Tamara)
March 24, 2023 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and on other grounds filed by Anthony Soto, Alberto Vazquez Matos, Stephen Zrike Jr.. (Dulles, Aaron)
March 24, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and on other grounds by Anthony Soto, Alberto Vazquez Matos, Stephen Zrike Jr..(Dulles, Aaron)
March 24, 2023 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Holyoke Public Schools, Stephen Mahoney, Lori McKenna. (Kelly, Paul)
March 24, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Holyoke Public Schools, Stephen Mahoney, Lori McKenna.(Kelly, Paul)
March 23, 2023 Filing 26 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jessica L. Draper Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9773824 by Holyoke Public Schools, Stephen Mahoney, Lori McKenna. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jessica L. Draper)(Kelly, Paul)
March 9, 2023 Filing 25 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered granting #23 Defendants Soto, Vazquez Matos, and Zrike's Assented to Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and #24 Defendants' Assented to Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint and Exceed Page Limitation. The memorandum supporting the motion to dismiss filed by defendants Soto, Vazquez Matos, and Zrike may be up to 23 pages in length. Alternatively, they may join a response filed on behalf of all Defendants and supported by a Memorandum not to exceed 30 pages. Defendants Holyoke Public Schools, Lori McKenna, and Stephen Mahoney, or all defendants together, shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before 3/24/2023 and their supporting memorandum may not exceed 30 pages. (Zamorski, Michael)
March 8, 2023 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Holyoke Public Schools, Stephen Mahoney, Lori McKenna.(Kelly, Paul). Added an additional relief - MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on 3/8/2023 (Finn, Mary). (Main Document 24 replaced on 3/8/2023 with motion signed by counsel) (Finn, Mary). Modified on 3/8/2023 (Finn, Mary).
March 8, 2023 Filing 23 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Anthony Soto, Alberto Vazquez Matos, Stephen Zrike Jr..(Dulles, Aaron)
February 13, 2023 Filing 22 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/17/2023 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, All Defendants. (Zamorski, Michael)
February 10, 2023 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/17/2023 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by City of Holyoke, Holyoke Public Schools, Stephen Mahoney, Lori McKenna, Anthony Soto, Alberto Vazquez Matos, Stephen Zrike Jr..(Dulles, Aaron)
February 2, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed City of Holyoke served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. (Weaver, Michaela)
February 2, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed Holyoke Public Schools served on 1/5/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Weaver, Michaela)
February 2, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Stephen Mahoney served on 1/3/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Weaver, Michaela)
February 2, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lori McKenna served on 1/5/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Weaver, Michaela)
February 2, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by LB as Mother & Next Friend Minor Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 1, AD, as Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 2, JM, As Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 3. Alberto Vazquez Matos served on 1/3/2023, answer due 3/10/2023. Acknowledgement filed by LB as Mother & Next Friend Minor Jane Doe 4; Jane Doe 1; AD, as Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 2; JM, As Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 3. (Weaver, Michaela)
February 2, 2023 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by LB as Mother & Next Friend Minor Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 1, AD, as Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 2, JM, As Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 3. Stephen Zrike Jr. served on 12/30/2022, answer due 3/10/2023. Acknowledgement filed by LB as Mother & Next Friend Minor Jane Doe 4; Jane Doe 1; AD, as Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 2; JM, As Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 3. (Weaver, Michaela)
February 2, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Anthony Soto served on 12/30/2022, answer due 3/10/2023. (Weaver, Michaela)
January 20, 2023 Filing 13 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Defendants Holyoke Public Schools, Lori McKenna and Stephen Mahoney's Assented to Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' response shall be filed on or before 3/17/2023. (Figueroa, Tamara)
January 19, 2023 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Holyoke Public Schools, Stephen Mahoney, Lori McKenna.(Kelly, Paul)
January 19, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul V. Kelly on behalf of Holyoke Public Schools, Stephen Mahoney, Lori McKenna (Kelly, Paul)
January 18, 2023 Filing 10 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: Electronic Order granting #9 Assented-to Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint. Defendants Soto, Vazquez Matos, and Zrike shall respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be filed on or before 3/10/2023. (Zamorski, Michael)
January 17, 2023 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 10, 2023 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Anthony Soto, Alberto Vazquez Matos, Stephen Zrike Jr..(Dulles, Aaron)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Dulles on behalf of Anthony Soto, Alberto Vazquez Matos, Stephen Zrike Jr. (Dulles, Aaron)
January 5, 2023 Filing 7 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: Electronic Order granting #6 Plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement of Time for Service of Process. Plaintiffs shall have until February 2, 2023 to complete service on all defendants. (Zamorski, Michael)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/02/2023 to Complete Service of Process and File Returns of Service by AD, as Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 2, JM, As Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 1, LB as Mother & Next Friend Minor Jane Doe 4. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Michaela M. Weaver in Support)(Weaver, Michaela)
October 11, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Figueroa, Tamara)
October 9, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Danieli, Chris)
October 9, 2022 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 10/6/2022 Case Number 1:22-cv-11701. (Danieli, Chris)
October 6, 2022 Filing 2 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (Dore, Samantha)
October 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen Mahoney, Anthony Soto, Stephen Zrike Jr., Holyoke Public Schools, Alberto Vazquez Matos, City of Holyoke, Lori McKenna, filed by AD, as Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 2, JM, As Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 1, LB as Mother & Next Friend Minor Jane Doe 4. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form) (Dore, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Doe 1 et al v. City of Holyoke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Michaela M. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AD, as Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 2
Represented By: Michaela M. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM, As Mother & Next Friend of Minor Jane Doe 3
Represented By: Michaela M. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LB as Mother & Next Friend Minor Jane Doe 4
Represented By: Michaela M. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Holyoke
Represented By: Jeanne A. Liddy
Represented By: Kathleen E. Degnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holyoke Public Schools
Represented By: Jessica L. Draper
Represented By: Paul V. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Soto
Represented By: Aaron M. Dulles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Vazquez Matos
Represented By: Aaron M. Dulles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Zrike Jr.
Represented By: Aaron M. Dulles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori McKenna
Represented By: Jessica L. Draper
Represented By: Paul V. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Mahoney
Represented By: Jessica L. Draper
Represented By: Paul V. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?