Graphic Communications Local 1B Health & Welfare Fund "A" et al v. CVS Caremark Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Graphic Communications Local 1B Health & Welfare Fund "A" and Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health and Welfare Fund, The
Defendant: CVS Caremark Corporation, Target Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark, LLC, Caremark Minnesota Specialty Pharmacy, LLC, Caremark Minnesota Specialty Pharmacy Holding, LLC, Coborn's Incorporated, Kmart Holding Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co., Sears Holdings Corporation, Snyder's Drug Stores (2009), Inc., Synder's Holdings (2009), Inc., Synder's Holdings, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 0:2009cv02203
Filed: August 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Noel
Presiding Judge: Rosenbaum
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron dated October 13, 2011 151 . 2. This matter is REMANDED to the District Court for the Fourth Judicial District, Hennepin County, Minnesota. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/18/11. (GRR)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER for Disqualification and for Reassignment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 03/15/11. (kll)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying 49 Motion to Dismiss; granting 76 Motion to Remand. This matter is remanded to the Hennepin County District Court for the Fourth Judicial District. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge James M. Rosenbaum on 07/19/2010. (kmc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graphic Communications Local 1B Health & Welfare Fund "A" et al v. CVS Caremark Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Caremark Corporation
Represented By: Andrea K Zollett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Craig S Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Robert H Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, LLC
Represented By: Andrea K Zollett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Minnesota Specialty Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Andrea K Zollett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Minnesota Specialty Pharmacy Holding, LLC
Represented By: Andrea K Zollett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coborn's Incorporated
Represented By: Gregory J Stenmoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kmart Holding Corporation
Represented By: Jill - NA M Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck and Co.
Represented By: Jill - NA M Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Jill - NA M Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snyder's Drug Stores (2009), Inc.
Represented By: James K Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synder's Holdings (2009), Inc.
Represented By: James K Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synder's Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: James K Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Adam W Wiers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: David A Applebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graphic Communications Local 1B Health & Welfare Fund "A"
Represented By: Brian A Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health and Welfare Fund, The
Represented By: John W Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?