Dan v. Douglas County, et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Terry Dan
Defendant: Administration Staff, Barbie, Blum, Case Management, Commissary Staff, Cummings, Douglas County, Dr. Esh, Estevez, Foster, Donna Fricke, K. A. Gamble, C. L. Godwin, Graham, Haddad, Inmate Account Staff, N. A. Jordan, Kitchen Staff, Lisa, Maintenance Staff, M. K. Mclelean, Medical Staff, Raimez, S. M. Rose and Valquir
Case Number: 8:2018cv00031
Filed: January 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On May 24, 2019, the court ordered Plaintiff to update his address with the court within 30 days or face dismissal of this action with prejudice 44 . Plaintiff has not updated his address or taken any other action in this ma tter as ordered. This matter is dismissed with prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. The court will enter judgment by a separate document.Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(SLP)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must update his address within 30 days. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action with prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 24, 2019: check for address. (Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 6/24/2019.) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (CS)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Amended Complaint 27 filed by Anthony Terry Dan. After initial review:- Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Grievances (filing no. 28 ) and motion to amend complaint (filing no. 29 ) are granted to the extent the court considers these documents as part of the Amended Complaint. - Plaintiff's excessive force claims against Officer Blum and Officer Haddad in their individual capacities may proceed to service of process. All remaining claims and defenda nts are dismissed from this matter without prejudice for failure to state a claim.- The clerk of court is directed to obtain the last known addresses for Defendants Blum and Haddad from the Marshals Service for service of process on them in their individual capacities...- The clerk of court is directed to remove all named defendants from the case caption except for Officer Blum and Officer Haddad. The clerk of court is further directed to update the case caption to reflect that Officer Blum and Officer Haddad are sued in their individual capacities only. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 6/26/2019 to check for completion of service of process.Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Plaintiff's motion for status (filing no. 31 ) is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Grievances (filing no. 10 ) is granted to the extent that the court will consider the documents attached to the motion as supplemental to the Complaint. Plaintiff has until August 27, 2018, to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. If Plaintiff choose s to file an amended complaint, the court will conduct further review of Plaintiff's claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e) and 1915A in the normal course of business. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: August 27, 2018: check for amended complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff a blank civil complaint form. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Issue Warrant on Inmate Account Staff Debbie Otwell (Filing No. 6 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 2 ), is granted. The filing fee shall be collected and remitted, as funds exist, in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). Until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid, the prisoner shall be obligated to pay, and the agency having custody of the prisoner shall forward to the clerk of the court, 20 percent of the preceding month's income in such months as the account exceeds $10.00. The clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order on the appropriate financial officer for Plaintiff's current institution. T he next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiffs claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and financial officer)(LKO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan v. Douglas County, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administration Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissary Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Esh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estevez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Fricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. A. Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. L. Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmate Account Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. A. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitchen Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maintenance Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. K. Mclelean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raimez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. M. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valquir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Terry Dan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?