Jamal Damon Hendrix v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: Jamal Damon Hendrix
Defendant: Linda C. Adams, Anderson, Michael Anderson, Romeo Aranas, James Greg Cox, Roland Daniels, D Dawson, Frank Dreesen, Tammie Dunn, Authur Emling, Timothy Filson, Sheryl L. Foster, Judith Gibson, V. Jones, Sergeant Joseph, William Kulolia, Cory Leavitt, C Maryeswar, Nurse J. Murphy, Jennifer Nash, Jason Nelson, Dwight Neven, Carter Potter, Sergeant J. Scott, State of Nevada, Bruce Stroud, Q. Trailers and Brian E. Williams, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00560
Filed: March 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting ECF No. 137 Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER that Defendants' motion to continue settlement conference (ECF No. 128 ) is GRANTED. The settlement conference is hereby CONTINUED to 9:30 a.m. on December 17, 2018. Settlement conference statements must be submitted by 3:00 p.m. on December 10, 2018, and shall be delivered to the undersigned's box in the Clerk's Office. All other requirements established in the order at Docket No. 122 continue to govern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER that Defendants file a response to ECF No. 123 Motion to appear at settlement conference by video by 10/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER that the Court SETS a settlement conference to commence at 9:30 a.m. on November 15, 2018, in the chambers of the undersigned Magistrate Judge, Fourth Floor, Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard South , Las Vegas, Nevada. The settlement conference statements shall be submitted, in an envelope marked "Confidential," directly to the undersigned's box in the Clerk's Office not later than 3:00 p.m. on November 8, 2018. DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/19/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 98 ) is granted in part and denied in part. It is granted with respect to: (1) the deliberate indifference claims in Count I; (2) the excessive force claim against Defendan t Emling in Count II; and (3) the First Amendment retaliation claim against Defendant Potter in Count III. It is denied in all other respects. Thus, Hendrix's case may proceed only with respect to: (1) Hendrix's allegations that Defendant s Dawson, Nelson, Trainer, and Scott used excessive force when escorting Hendrix to disciplinary segregation on November 15, 2013 (Count I); and (2) Hendrix's procedural due process claim that Potter prevented him from calling a witness at the November 18, 2013 disciplinary hearing (Count III). Plaintiff's request of status in civil action (ECF No. 119 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 72 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The Court permits the following claims to proceed: the retaliation claim against Dunn in Count I; the excessive force claims against Daws on, Nelson, Scott, Trailer, and Jones in Count I; the deliberate indifference claim against Maryeswar, Adams, Murphy, and Aranas in Count I; the excessive force claim against Emling in Count II; the procedural due process and retaliation claims against Potter in Count III. Defendants have until 10/18/2017 to file their renewed motion motion for summary judgment on the basis of qualified immunity. It is further ordered that Defendants' Motion to Seal (ECF No. 74 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER overruling Plaintiff's ECF No. 64 Objection. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting ECF No. 65 / 66 Motion to Extend Time : The deadline for dispositive motion is EXTENDED to January 7, 2017. The deadline to file a joint proposed pretrial order is EXTENDED to February 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying ECF Nos. 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Parties and 37 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/01/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying ECF No. 62 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting for a Telephonic Conference with U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/07/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's ECF No. 60 Motion for Service; directing Clerk to send Plaintiff a copy of this order and ECF No. 27 Order (mailed 10/5/2016). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Denying 45 Motion To Extend Copy Work Limit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part 21 , 22 , 23 , and 24 motions. US Marshal shall serve Defendants Dunn, Manjeshwar, Dawson, Joseph, Scott, Adams, and Jones. Clerk shall provide Plaintiff with 7 USM-285 forms (mailed 3/28/16). Clerk shall iss ue summonses to above Defendants under seal and deliver to US Marshal for service. Plaintiff shall have 20 days to furnish US Marshal with required USM-285 forms. Defendants' addresses shall remain sealed and shall not be provided to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall SEND a copy of this order to the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office. The Clerk of the Court shall also SEND a copy of this order to the attention of the Chief of Inmate Services for the Nevada Department of Corrections The Clerk of the Court shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order and a copy of 9 Complaint on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. Notice due within 21 days. Answers due within 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamal Damon Hendrix v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda C. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Aranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greg Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammie Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Authur Emling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Filson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl L. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kulolia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Maryeswar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant J. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q. Trailers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. Williams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Damon Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?