IN RE: BENICAR (OLMESARTAN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff: ANITA M. GRAVES, THOMAS GARY PETTY, CINDY MILLER, KENNETH DEHERTOGH, DORIS ALEXANDER, SAMARION MAGA, JASON ALEXANDER JONES, JAMES WILCOX, ML MACK, SHARLEE SNAIL, DIANA ODLE, Vicki L Changet, MARGARET WOOTEN, JANICE MOONEY, WILLIAM FAULKNER, CLEMMA ANDERSON, PAULETTE TRUSS, LINDA HUDSON, EDWARD G PANTOYA, DALLAS E CURLING, JR., JAMES W. STENERSON, DIANE RODLAND, SHIRLEY LOVELADY, TERESA MCELRATH, DONNA PRICE, JACKIE FELDER, BOBBY THOMAS, MICHELLE SEARS, ESTATE OF GERTRUDE LAKE, TODD MARSH, RENETTA INGRAM, JOHN CARNEY, ESTATE OF JERRY CAPPS, PATRICIA S BLACKMON, ANITA PINKSTON, JIMMY HICKS, ROSEMARY C. BLOCK, ROBERT P JANNOT, DIANE HICKS, CHARLOTTE WILLIAMS, CANDACE WILDE, CHEMEKA STRAUGHTER, ALBERT D ELLSWORTH, SANDRA MUSTAIN, KENNETH HORTON, TOM DO, PAT HENDERSON, EARLENE MCQUEEN, MAMIE WATTS, JAMES RICHARD CAREY, FRANCES GARRETT, CARL MCINNIS, SR., JACQUELINE C. HOLMON, VELMA SMITH-MAYS, LARRY CARRERE, JAMES P. COLE, KELVIN DILLIHUNT, MARIA G. SANCHEZ, CLIFFORD BRYANT, JR., PHILLIS FAUSTERMANN, CHERYL WELLS, SUSIE MACK, PEGGY GRIFFIN, SHAWN HARRIS, Marilyn McCleskey, JEFFREY BROWN, RITA FAUCETT, THOMAS JOINER, EMMANUEL KEITH, DONALD G. CROPSEY, MICHAEL PRESUTTI, DEBORAH BAILES, Goldie Jennings, EARNESTINE KENNEDY, CAROLINE JANOWSKI, ARDELL HARPER, LOIS WILLIAMS, LAWRENCE DOYLE, MICHAEL J. JANKOVIAK, LOUVENIA RICHARD, CONCESA ARROYO, VALORIE ROBINSON, JIM POTTER, MARY EVELYN SCHMIDT, MARK RIVERS, GENEVA PERRY, BETTY BRYAN, PATRICIA BAILEY, EDITH RICHEY, KAYE CORDER, BRETT VILLARRUBIA, Harold W. Beckjorden, THOMAS KENDRO, ALEASIA EVANS, Chance Gill, CYNTHIA MCGINNIS, GRACIE LANEY, A.J. JENKINS, BRENDA EDWARDS, VERNELL SANDS, JOE GOODE, JONNIE HOOD, PAMELA GOULART, DONNA MIGLIORI, BOOKER T. THOMAS, ANTONIO JOHNSON, HENRY WOOD, TONY HOLTS, CINDY SUE LEGGETT, JAMES R. HUGHES, KRISTINA Y. BABB, BARBARA JONES, INEZ HOWARD, PATRICIA NINO, ROBERT GAMBRELL, CRAIG SIMPKINS, TIM MULLINS, DAWN ROBB, MCKINDLE BELER, PATRICIA MCLAURIN, GLENDA BAKER, PATRICIA TAYLOR, GARY L. EDWARDS, VIVIAN GOMEZ, LUIS SALAS, JR., JOSEPH NESTE, CHARLES WESTBROOKS, JEAN WRIGHT, BERNICE H. ATKINSON, MARCUS COLLINS, RUDY RODRIGUEZ, GEORGE A GUY, THEODORE DOUGLAS, CONNIE ANDREWS, RUTH WILLIAMS, MATTIE B. THRASH, Patricia Heckaman, CHARLES R. EVANS, LARNCE GARRETT, Tracy Handley, ROBERT M. HERRICK, ROBERT WOODARD, MIKYRAA WALKER, DELORES AGUILAR, JUNE DIESS, BILL CENAN, KRISTINE HILLIS, SABIA MANISCALCO, Bernadette Bujol-Brown, JEFFREY ALAN ELLIOTT, THE ESTATE OF LENDELL THEVENIN, GLORIA JEFFERSON, CHARLOTTE METCALF, MAUREEN L. THOMAS, LAWRENCE WADE RODLAND, MONICA COBBERT, JOEL MADDOX, MARGARET EARLENE JACKSON, RONALD SHARPLEY, LOUINE SHULONDA, DARLENE DEWALL, DANNY A WRIGHT, Merton Campbell, LOLA K. TOLE, JIMMIE JONES, GENEVA ALBRIGHT, EARTHA HELMS, DOSHIA WALKER, ROBERT D. CAMPBELL, JR., CHRISTOPHE L. PIRET, Frances A. Beckjorden, CATHY MCDONOUGH, ANITA SLONE, AUDREY FORD LEVINE, BELIA CUYLER, GEORGE T. EDINGER, JUDITH MOEBIS, JAMAAL RODGERS, LAUREL E. MCCONNELL, JACKIE PERSON, LEE ROY DEMORAES, BARNEY JAMES HENDRIX, JOANNE A. ROSSI, DEBRA TAYLOR, ESTHER TUCKER, WILLIE NASH, JR., CARMELITA L. STRICKLAND, CLEASTER A. LOVE, DIXIE ALES, ANNE PETTAWAY, FANNIE MINIX, FRANK BALTIMORE, BETTE BOHNER, RANDALL MCGOWIN, MAGGIE JEAN CURRY, WILLIE ARCHER, MICHAEL RIESS, JOAN ROMANO, MAYLENE GORDON, PATRICIA BOOKER, TRAISEE BARNES, LOLA DAVIS, SHIRLEY BROWN, BERTHA MAY FRANKLIN, JUNE PERCELL, ROSE JUNIOUS, DOROTHY CARLTON, THELMA BROWN, REGINALD WILTZ, FABIAN HASKINS, NETTIE MILLER, DENISE DISHAROOM, MICHAEL WILLARD, MARY BROCK, OLIVER MCWILLIAMS, VINCENT THOMPSON, DOUGLAS WALLACE, Lisa Kay Lee, ANTHONY WOODALL, TREVOR TRIMBLE, EVELYN MATHIS, BERTHA CAMPBELL, WILLIAM LONG, LAMAR WILLIAMS, BARBARA SCOTT, Annette M Johnson, MARY HARRIS, WILLIAM ARCHIE MCHENRY, FRANCIS LANNI, KEVIN C. MURRELL, CYNTHIA WALTON, HERMAINE MUNO, SHERRI LYNN RAKER, VICTORIA COOPER, MICHAEL MAY, CHARLENE ANDERSON, PATRICIA SONNIER, RODNEY ZIMPELMAN, ORETHA SUTTLE, PEGGY RAY, TANYA R. WILLIAMS, JOE W. CROWNOVER, SHIRLEY LAMBERT, TONI S TRIGGS, MARGARET MANAGER, JACK GRESHAM, CARLA COURTNEY, ANGEL MCFAN, DIANE C. WENTZ, DIANE TOOLE, KIMBERLY BENSON, HORST W. KWECH, PAMELA ASKEW, GEORGE W. KIGER III, SHERICE R. DRUE, ANDREW CLAY, JOYCE NANETTE FILIPSKI, KATHRYN JOHNSON, ROBIN HARTMAN, STANLEY KIEFFER, HENRY TURKEL, THOMAS JOHNSON, SIMON JOHNSON, MARY L. THOMAS, MELODY W. YOES, RICHARD GROVER, DAVID ZIMMER, VONDERLITA SITAULA, MABEL JACKSON, KENNETH MCMILLIAN, CECIL SHERRILL, MONA SMITH, TIMOTHY COCHRAN, JOHNNY GONZALES, WILSON DARBY, MICHAEL B. SCOTT, PATRICIA D'ANGELO, MARVIN EASTERLING, HARRY KRUMENAKER, PATRICIA MILLIKEN GARCARZ, YOLANDA EVANS, NICKIE JACKSON BOYKIN, GILES RAGAN, ASELINA TEMBER, Teresa Cooksey, NORWECHIE JONES, JOHN ANDRY, GEORGE WILT, MICHAEL J. RODRIGUEZ, BONNIE C SCOTT, SHEILA PHILLIPS, EARLENE TOMLIN, HERBERT KEYS, BETTY MAY, WILLIAM E. CALLEN, JR., BONNIE BARR, WILLIAM WEIGL, ANTHONY J. MARTINO, VICTOR M. MORALES, JOHN HALE, ANA PORCO, WANDA LONG, SONJA L. DODS, TROY SCHMIDT, RAM SITAULA, NORMAN C KNUTSON, MICHAEL HOOVER, WILLIAM SCHAFF, JAMES CRAIG, CHRISTIAN BLYTHE, RONALD J. SANDERS, FRANK SZYMKOWICZ, ROBERT AASEN, KAREN SHIPLEY, WILLIAM RICHARD, SHIRLEY CHATMAN, DELORES KOONCE, JOHNNIE MAE GAGE, MARION A PORTER, STEVEN GRIGSBY, BASILE VALTADOROS, FRED PERRYMAN, RITA E VANDERGRIFT, ANITA DANIELS, JEFFREY WILLIAMS, JAMES GOULDEN, RAYBELL M ADAMS, JR., RALPH LOREE, NATHANIEL JACKSON, JOAN RICHARDSON, ESTHER JANICE, BARBARA COOPER, MICHAEL COATS, JOSEPH RANDAZZO, ERNESTINE BENNETT, SHARON HAMMONS, TINA BOIKE, TERRY BRYAN, TAMMY GILES, DOROTHY SMITH, MARIA LUISA WILSON-VELEZ, CAROLYN STILL, JAMES MIMS, PATRICIA LATTERSON, Ruth Sorgenfrei, Gerald Jones, OLLIE O. RIVERS, ROCKY BLACKENSHIP, JAMES HOLLIDAY, KEVIN RIECKE, VIRGINIA ROSE ANN RODRIGUEZ, SHEILA BREAUX, GILBERT ALLEN STEBBINS, JAMES BARTEE, BOLKER SCHNITZER, LINDA PAFFORD, SHERYL CLARK, KEVIN JOHNSON, CAROL ROBINSON, DAVID MINNICK, ROSIE LEE MISIASZEK, VICKI MARTINEZ, STEVEN K BOUKNIGHT, ANNETTE RUMMEL, BARBARA SALLEY, OLLIE K. ROBINSON III, CHARLES MCCREA, MELISSA S MOZIE, SHARON ANDREWS, ANN MARIE PLUMMER, RUTH RUSSO, VERONICA THACKER, GROVER JOHNSON, MICHELE KIRKLAND, VANESSA OUTLAW, JUSTIN WATKINS, RICHARD WATSON, LILLIE MORGAN, STANLEY BROOKS, CHARLES A. HERREN, BLANCA A. GORDON, PATRICIA WILSON, AMY WELCH, MONIQUE MCCOY, THELMA BUXTON, JUDITH MACHON, FRANCES MARY EWALD, MARY M. MASKELL-CIAMPA, PATRICIA COLLINS, JIMMY F. COOK, CLISTA PENNIE, EMMITT MCCLENDON, PATRICIA RUTH MUTZ, MARCIA JAMES, ESSIE TAYLOR, MARGARITA VARGAS, DESSIE ALEXANDER, HELEN MARIE WALKER, ALEX SMITH, Glenda Campbell, DORIS PHILLIPS, CHERYL SPENCER, KEN IFILL, MOLLIE TOWER, ANTHONY BARNES, FRANK MUNOZ, JR., MARY ANN BOBBITT, DANIEL BURNS, CHARLENE MCGRUDER, EDWARD GLENN DELEE, BRENDA LOWE, JOHN C. HIGHLEY, THOMAS GRANSEE, FLORENCE JANE HAGER, MILDRED DAVIS, DORIS SOUTH, JOHN MONROE, ESTATE OF MILLOW D. LANE, JOSEPH GALLOW, ESTATE OF LINDA HINKLEY, JOHN WOHLFART, WALTER MAY, SHAWNNA CARTER, JUNE INGRAM, Louis Verduzco, LYNN KING, SR., BOYD WISECUP, ERA SMITH, JANET HAMMOND, DIANE ELLIS, KELVIN MURPHY, DORIS WOOLFOLK, ADELE TYSON, REBECCA MAPLES, Judi Lee Hook, MOSES MITCHELL, ESTATE OF FAY J. WRIGHT ON BEHALF OF THE ANTICIPATED PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES AND HEIRS, DEIEDRE WRIGHT AND ALVITA MCKINNEY, CHARLENE JENKINS, JACK YOUNG, CURTIS COX, ROBERT KRABILL, EDISON ROSS, STEPHEN L. WOFFORD, CHARLES M. HALL, HELEN MILLIRON, Dave Huggins, DEAN WELLS, PATEESE ELLIDRIDGE, GARY BENTLEY, SR., RUTH SCHACK, ZELDA M. DOBBS, BARBARA WHITE, KELVIN CHAPMAN, SHARON L. ABRAMS, ELIZABETH NICOLE WAFER, PATRICIA ARRINGTON, DENNIS WOLL, MARCIA BLAIR, FRANK WILDE, ROSE SUTTON, GIOVAN JOHNSON, SHARYN HODGE, Tammy Scott-Griffin, CHARLES BOONE, LINDA L. RASNAKE, DEANISE HOLDER, JUAN CARLOS LUGO, NORMA BOCK, LENDA WEST, BEAETHEL TERRY, GARY MAGEE, EMMIT WOMACK, JR., TED WYCALL, MARY THERESA KINNARD, JOENETTE MENTZEL, LIONEL L HAMILTON, SHAMEKA LAKEA TAYLOR, COLTON B. WINEBARGER, BARBARA GIVENS, DON DYER, JOANNE COSTAIN, VALERIE SPENCER, JENNIFER MCQUEEN, ANN REYNOLDS, RHONDA J. ELDRIDGE, ULYSSES DAVIS, FRANK HELMKE, BETTY LOWDEN, TERRY HUGHES, SYBIL RICH, THERESA BUSH, DONALD M. BENNINGER, MINNIE R. WOODS, Beverly Roach, JONATHAN COLBERT, WILLIAM SHEPARD, CHARMAINE PURNELL, WILLIAM HUGHES, LINDA ESTEP, JOE AGEE, JR., CAROLYN SLOAN, ESSYE M HEDDLESTEN, LOUETTA GLYMPH, EUGENE HANUS, AMANDA BRANCH, PATRICIA NOWELL, ADAM SLACK, PAMELA CARTER, JENNIFER HARRIS, VICTORIA HAMLIN, CARL PEDEN, FRED REUTER, DAVID BRUST, DEMETRICE GORDON, KENNETH J. GREENFIELD, MICHAEL ELLIS, MARY SCRIVINES, DONNA JOHNSON, DAWN ROSEBROUGH, JEFF MAHANES, VINCENT SACCA, VERNON GRAY, MARJORIE L ROSS, LAVELLE GREENFIELD, ANTHONY GAUDIO, BONNIE FLETCHER, BARBARA STEPNICK, KATARINA HARRY, ERNESTINE SWANSON, ALTON VERDIN, ZATITI MOODY, PAMELA KINDER, ZELMA TRAYLOR, VIRGINIA LEDUC, ANGELLA LINDEN, JASON L. FARIS, HOWARD MCGAHA and JEANETTE HUNT
Defendant: FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC and DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.
Case Number: 1:2015md02606
Filed: April 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 MDL DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/28/20. (dd, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 1281 Letter from Anthony Hudson addressed to Judge Kugler. (rtm, )(nm)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1280 Class Participant and Victim Impact Statemente from Anthony Hudson. (rtm, )
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1279 Order of MDL Panel transferring certain action from the District of Oklahoma Western; Case# 5:20cv00067 to this court. (dd, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 1278 Letter from David P. Matthews. (MATTHEWS, DAVID)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 MDL ORDER that the common benefit fees and expenses shall be paid by the qualified settlement fund administrator to the common benefit law firms, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/10/2019. (rtm, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 1276 CERTIFIED ORDER of USCA in lieu of formal MANDATE as to #1268 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by Gerald J. Williams, Esq. and Mark R. Cuker, Esq. (Finance notified) (ca3kr)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1275 Letter from Mark R. Cuker. (CUKER, MARK)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1274 Supplement to victim's impact statement, from Anthony J. Hudson. (rtm, )(nm)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1273 MOTION Modify Court's Order of 12/14/19 and other relief by BENICAR (OLMESARTAN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief Letter Brief)(SLATER, ADAM)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1272 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq. on behalf of the Plaintiffs' Executive Committee in response to Mr. Cuker's 12/6/19 letter. (SLATER, ADAM)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1271 Letter from Mark R. Cuker. (CUKER, MARK)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1270 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq. on behalf of Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLATER, ADAM)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1269 USCA Case Number 19-3753 for #1268 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by Dolores Meyer. USCA Case Manager Kirsi (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3kr)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1268 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Gerald J. Williams, Esq. and Mark R. Cuker, Esq. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-10141503. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 12/26/2019. (CUKER, MARK) Modified on 11/27/2019 (js).
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1267 ORDER Denying the Petition to Establish Qualified Settlement Fund Subaccount. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/22/2019. (dmr)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1266 Letter from Behram V. Parekh re #1265 Order. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1265 LETTER ORDER from Judge Kugler, addressed to Mr. Parekh re unopposed petition filed 11/13/2019, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/15/2019. (rtm, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 1264 Letter from Anthony J. Hudson re benicar drug effect. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rtm, )
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1263 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting the CBCs Final Recommendation dated 10 September 2019 that constitute this Courts ordered distribution of attorneys fees and costs for common benefit work and expenses expended in this MDL. ORDERED that the distribution of attorneys fees and costs for common benefit work and expenses expended in this MDL shall occur only after the awards to all participants in the Olmesartan settlement have been paid or distributed. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/14/2019. (rtm, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 1262 APPLICATION/PETITION for ESTABLISHING QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND SUBACCOUNT (Unopposed) for by Behram Parekh. (Attachments: #1 Order)(PAREKH, BEHRAM)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1261 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the objections of Gerald L. Williams, Esquire and Mark R. Cuker, Esquire, to the Final Recommendation of the Benicar Common Benefit Committee are OVERRULED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/5/2019. (rtm, )
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-17) transferring certain action from the District of South Carolina; Case# 19-2350 to this court. (dd, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 1259 Letter from Benzina Scott filed in District of South Carolina re request to transfer case to this MDL. (rtm, ) (Main Document 1259 replaced on 10/25/2019) (aji, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 1258 Letter from Benzina Scott filed in the District of South Carolina re request to be included in MDL. (rtm, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1257 LETTER from Judge Kugler addressed to all counsel re Order from 9/23/2019 to establish the qualified settlement fund. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/1/2019. (rtm, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 1256 RESPONSE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(CUKER, MARK)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1255 Letter from Stuart L. Goldenberg, Esquire re #1253 Order. (PITTNER, LAURA)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1254 Letter from Richard M. Golomb, Esquire re #1253 Order. (GOLOMB, RICHARD)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1253 LETTER ORDER from Judge Kugler addressed to all counsel re order to establish qualified settlement fund. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/23/2019. (rtm, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1252 ORDER TO ESTABLISH QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/23/2019. (rtm, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 1251 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/31/2019, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC ((856) 435-7172). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 10/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2019. (tf, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 1250 Letter from Adam M. Slater on behalf of Plaintiffs' Negotiating Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLATER, ADAM)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1249 ORDER granting #1242 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED that Messrs. Cuker and Williams shall serve their objections to the CBCs Preliminary Allocation by August 5, 2019. ORDERED the new due date for the CBCs Final Recommendation for Common Benefit Awards and Allocation is September 10, 2019, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/1/2019. (rtm, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 1248 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2019 re #1242 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1223 Order, filed by CYNTHIA MYERS. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic.) (rtm, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 1247 NOTICE by Dolores Meyer Of Conference Call Information (CUKER, MARK)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1246 Letter In Response to Motion from Esther Berezofsky re #1242 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1223 Order,, . CLERKS NOTE: THIS DOCUMENT WAS RECEIVED BY EMAIL TO THE CM/ECF HELP DESK ON 7/29/2019. DUE TO TECHNICAL FAILURE OF CM/ECF.(dmw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1245 Letter from Mark R. Cuker. (CUKER, MARK)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1244 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq. on behalf of Common Benefit Committee. (SLATER, ADAM)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1243 MDL TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED oral argument will be held via telephone conference call on July 31, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. on the motion filed by Messrs. Cuker and Williams for an extension of time to respond to the CBC's preliminary allocation [Doc. No. 1242]. All responses to the motion shall be filed by close of business on July 29, 2019. Mr. Cuker shall set up the conference call and arrange for all interested parties to participate on the call. Ms. Bezerofsky is ORDERED to participate. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/18/19. (Schneider, Joel)
July 16, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #1242 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1223 Order,, . Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1242 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1223 Order,, by CYNTHIA MYERS. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(WILLIAMS, GERALD)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1241 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD J. WILLIAMS on behalf of CYNTHIA MYERS (WILLIAMS, GERALD)
July 3, 2019 Member Case Closed on 7/3/2019 for MDL 2606. (rtm, )
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1240 MDL ORDER allowing the Common Benefit Committee to permit Golomb & Honik to upload its documentation supporting its expense amount of $25,720.71. Nothing in this Order relates to expenses different than those previously reported by Golomb & Honik. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/18/2019. (rtm, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 1239 Letter from Richard M. Golomb, Esquire re #1223 Order,,. (GOLOMB, RICHARD)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1238 MDL LETTER ORDER addressed to Mr. Slater re letter sent to the Court from Plaintiff, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/4/2019. (rtm, )
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1237 MDL ORDER that Cuker has not demonstrated good cause to submit his late application for reimbursement of Common Benefit work, and the Common Benefit Committee may not consider his application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/6/2019. (rtm, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1236 MDL ORDER the Common Benefit Committee may determine whether supplementation to the reported expenses is appropriate. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/29/2019. (rtm, )
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1235 MDL ORDER that the Common Benefit Committee may determine whether suchsupplementation to Goldenberg Laws reported expenses is appropriate. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/26/2019. (rtm, )
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1234 MDL TEXT ORDER: Parties and Counsel are advised that the 1233 MDL order was filed in error and should be disregarded. The Court hereby VACATES the 1233 order and directs the Clerk of Court to vacate the document from the docket. SO ORDERED by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/25/2019. (lm)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1233 MDL ORDER granting an opportunity to CB firms to present their objections to their common benefit award and be fairly heard on 7 May 2019. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/25/2019. (rtm, )
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1232 MDL ORDER that the Common Benefit Committee may determine whether suchsupplementation to Golomb & Honiks reported hours is appropriate. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/25/2019. (rtm, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 1231 Letter from Mark R. Cuker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CUKER, MARK)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1230 Letter from Esther Berezofsky, Esq. re #1228 Letter, #1226 Notice of Appearance. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BEREZOFSKY, ESTHER)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1229 Letter from Laura L. Pittner re #1223 Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Laura L. Pittner, #2 Declaration Declaration of Stuart L. Goldenberg, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(PITTNER, LAURA)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1228 Letter from Mark R. Cuker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(CUKER, MARK)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1227 Letter from Peter H. Weinberger. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(WEINBERGER, PETER)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1226 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK R. CUKER on behalf of Dolores Meyer (CUKER, MARK)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1225 Letter from Richard M. Golomb, Esquire re #1223 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G&H Firm Biography, #2 Exhibit G&H Summary Hours, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Richard M. Golomb, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Steven Resnick, #5 Certificate of Service)(GOLOMB, RICHARD)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1224 Letter from Christopher L. Coffin re #1223 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Christopher Coffin Expense Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Christopher Coffin Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Nicholas Rockforte Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Jessica Reynolds Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Dave Hundley Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 - Shayna Dupont Declaration)(COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1223 CASE MANGAGEMENT ORDER NO. 41B Regarding Common Benefit Committee and Common Benefit Process. The Clerk's Office is hereby identifying Doc. 1223 as Case Management Order No. 41B Regarding Common Benefit Committee and Common Benefit Process. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/3/19. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Common Benefit Request)(dd, )All future filings referring to this document should refer to it as Case Management Order No. 41B. Modified on 4/24/2019 to update CMO No. to 41B (dd). (Main Document 1223 replaced on 4/24/2019 to correct Case Management Order number, should be 41B and not 41) (bf). (Main Document 1223 replaced on 4/24/2019) (bf).
April 3, 2019 Member Case Closed on 4/2/2019 for MDL 2606. (dmr)
March 12, 2019 Filing 1221 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Common Benefit Committee's Proposed Common Benefit Request Plan)(SLATER, ADAM)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1222 Case Management Order NO. 41A. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/26/2019. (dd, ) ).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Management Order NO. 41A. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/26/2019. (rtm, )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1220 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 41. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/26/2019. (rtm, )
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1219 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 2/26/2019 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/19/2019. (rtm, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 1218 Letter from Letter Brief for CBC Appointment. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause Why Common Benefit Committee Should Not Be Appointed)(SLATER, ADAM)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1217 NOTICE of Change of Address by MATTHEW RYAN MCCARLEY (MCCARLEY, MATTHEW)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1216 ORDER Dismissing without prejudice 17-cv-299. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/4/18. (dd, )
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1215 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 40 REGARDING AMENDMENT OF COMMON BENEFIT ASSESSMENTS TO COMPENSATE PARTICIPATING COUNSEL FOR COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND RELATED COSTS. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/25/2018. (rtm, )
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1214 QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING TRANSMISSION AND RECEIPT OF PERSONAL HEALTH INFORMATION BY THE LIEN RESOLUTION ADMINISTRATOR. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/20/2018. (rtm, )
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1213 ORDER withdrawing Benjamin J Steinberg as counsel for Plaintiff Debra Taylor, adding Regina S. Johnson as counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/17/2018. (rtm, )
September 17, 2018 Attorney REGINA SHARLOW JOHNSON for CECILIA MEDINA, added. Attorney BENJAMIN JACOB STEINBERG terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/14/2018. (rtm, )
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1212 ORDER withdrawing Benjamin J Steinberg as counsel for Plaintiff Cecila Medina, adding Regina S. Johnson as counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/14/2018. (rtm, )
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1211 ORDER granting 6 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney BENJAMIN JACOB STEINBERG terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/14/2018. (16-3482). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/14/2018. (tf, )
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1210 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney REGINA SHARLOW JOHNSON for WENDY K. QUALLS. Attorney BENJAMIN JACOB STEINBERG terminated (15-4924). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/14/2018. (tf, )
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1209 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney REGINA SHARLOW JOHNSON for SHIRLEY ZABRSA. Attorney BENJAMIN JACOB STEINBERG terminated (15-4901). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/14/2018. (tf, )
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1208 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney BENJAMIN JACOB STEINBERG terminated. (18-2093). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/14/2018. (tf, )
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1207 ORDER granting #1206 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/14/2018. (rtm, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 1206 MOTION for Protective Order /This Document Relates to All Cases by BENICAR (OLMESARTAN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Qualified Protective Order Medicaid Private Template, #2 Exhibit Qualified Protective Order CMS Template, #3 Certificate of Service)(COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
July 24, 2018 Filing 1205 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler: Hearing pursuant to case management order No. 39 held on 7/24/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder CARL NAMI, JR.) (rtm, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 1204 Letter from Behram V. Parekh re #1186 Order, #1190 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pamela Askew Stipulation for Dismissal, #2 Exhibit Scott Ortega Stipulation for Dismissal)(PAREKH, BEHRAM)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1202 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq.. (SLATER, ADAM)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1201 Letter from David C. DeGreeff. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of CMO No. 39)(DEGREEFF, DAVID)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference and Motion Hearing held on 7/19/2018. Telephone Status Conference held on the record. Hearing on Plaintiff's MOTIONS to Withdraw as counsel, held on the record via telephone. Decision reserved. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Recorder.) (tf, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 1200 Letter from Michael Zogby re #1190 Order. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1199 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference and Motion Hearing held on 7/17/2018. Hearing on Plaintiff's MOTIONS to Withdraw as counsel, held on the record via telephone. Decision reserved. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Recorder.) (tf, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 1198 Letter from Behram V. Parekh re #1186 Order, #1190 Order. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service of Case Management Order No. 39)(PAREKH, BEHRAM)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1197 Letter from David C. DeGreeff. (DEGREEFF, DAVID)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1196 Letter from David C. DeGreeff. (DEGREEFF, DAVID)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1195 Letter from Behram V. Parekh re #1190 Order. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1194 Letter from Susan M. Sharko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1193 Letter from Susan M. Sharko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
July 10, 2018 Filing 1192 CMO 39 B. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/10/2018. (rtm, )
July 10, 2018 Filing 1191 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ROBERT KESSLER. (PITTNER, LAURA)
July 9, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the docket entry #1189 filed by the Clerk's office on 7/9/2018 contains an incorrect date. The correct date for the scheduled telephonic conference is 7/19/2018 at 4:30 p.m. (rtm, )
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1190 MDL LETTER ORDER that an oral argument on the motions to withdraw as counsel will be held via telephone conference on July 17, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/9/2018. (rtm, )
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 MDL LETTER ORDER addressed to counsel that an oral argument on motions to withdraw as counsel will be held via telephone conference on 7/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/9/2018. (rtm, ) Modified on 7/9/2018 to correct date(rtm, ).
June 22, 2018 Filing 1188 Letter from Susan M. Sharko. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 MDL ORDER Re: Case Management Order No. 39a. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/20/2018. (rtm, )
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 39 Each Plaintiff and their counsel listed in the attached exhibit shall appear in person before the court on July 24, 2018 in Courtroom 4D in the Mitchell Cohen Courthouse, 400 Cooper Street, Camden, New Jersey 08101. Failure to attend this hearing is subject to sanctions for noncompliance with a court order. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(rtm, ) Modified due to clerical error on 6/7/2018 (rtm, ).
May 31, 2018 Filing 1185 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/31/2018. Ordered in-person status conference set for July 17, 2018 at 1:30PM in Courtroom 4D. (rtm, )
May 17, 2018 Filing 1184 Letter from Troy Rafferty. (NIGH, DANIEL)
May 17, 2018 Filing 1183 Letter from Susan M. Sharko. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
May 7, 2018 Filing 1182 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney DAVID JACOBY terminated. Attorney MARC ADAM GOLDICH for ALEXIS KOZAK, MARC ADAM GOLDICH for DAVID M. KOZAK, added.. (GOLDICH, MARC)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/31/2018 02:15 PM before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/3/2018. (rtm, ) Modified on 5/8/2018 (se).
April 18, 2018 Filing 1180 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY M. KUNTZ on behalf of MICHAEL HUGHES (KUNTZ, JEFFREY)
April 18, 2018 Filing 1179 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS P. CARTMELL on behalf of MICHAEL HUGHES (CARTMELL, THOMAS)
April 18, 2018 Filing 1178 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID C. DEGREEFF on behalf of MICHAEL HUGHES (DEGREEFF, DAVID)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 32A REGARDING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/10/2018. (rtm, )
April 4, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #1176 MOTION and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Increase Common Benefit Costs and Fee Assessments /This Document Relates to All Cases. Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 1176 MOTION and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Increase Common Benefit Costs and Fee Assessments /This Document Relates to All Cases by BENICAR (OLMESARTAN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 MDL ORDER that counsels Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for plaintiff Teresa Cooksey, case 17-12954, is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/6/2018. (rtm, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 1174 Letter from Shirley Shaddix addressed to Judge Kugler, Re: Case to be Reviewed.(Rec'd in chambers on 2/9/18) (js)
February 14, 2018 Filing 1173 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler/Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Conference held on 2/14/2018. Settlement conference to be set. (Court Reporter: None) (js)
January 29, 2018 Filing 1172 Letter, addressed to Ms. Shirley L. Shaddick, Re: Papers Rec'd by the Clerk on 1/26/18. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/29/18. (js)
January 25, 2018 Filing 1171 NOTICE of Change of Address by BEHRAM V. PAREKH (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
January 24, 2018 Filing 1170 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler/Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/24/2018. Ordered telephone conference set for February 14, 2018 at 1:30PM. (Court Reporter: Carl Nami, Jr.) (js)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 MDL TEXT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the in-person Order to Show Cause Hearing (set forth in Doc. 1161) HAS BEEN CANCELLED for Wednesday, January 24, 2018 at 2:00 pm EST in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, New Jersey 08101; it is further ORDERED that a telephone status conference with LEAD COUNSEL ONLY is set for Wednesday January 24, 2018 at 2:00pm. Lead Counsel for defendants shall arrange the conference call and provide call-in information to all counsel and the Court. So Ordered by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/23/2018. (lm)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 38 REGARDING EXTENSION OF OPT IN DEADLINE TO THE MASTER SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/16/18. (js)
January 10, 2018 Filing 1167 Letter from Adam M. Slater enclosing proposed form of Case Management Order No. 38 Regarding Opt In Deadline Extension. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLATER, ADAM)
January 5, 2018 Filing 1166 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MorrisBart LLC re #1159 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(GEIER, DENNIS)
January 4, 2018 Setting Deadlines as to #1164 Amended MOTION for Order to Show Cause . Motion set for 2/5/2018 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
January 4, 2018 Filing 1164 Amended MOTION for Order to Show Cause by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, to include Exhibit 1, appended hereto and which specifies the relevant Registered Unfiled Claimants and their counsel; and state the location of the in-person hearing: Courtroom 4D, Cohen Mitchell Courthouse, 4th and Cooper Streets, Camden, New Jersey, 08101. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/3/18. (js)
December 28, 2017 Setting Deadlines as to #1163 MOTION to Withdraw #1161 Order to Show Cause, #1159 MOTION for Order to Show Cause . Motion set for 2/5/2018 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
December 28, 2017 Filing 1163 MOTION to Withdraw #1161 Order to Show Cause, #1159 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Debbie Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCCARLEY, MATTHEW)
December 22, 2017 Filing 1162 AMENDED DOCUMENT by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. Amendment to #1159 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Amended Certification of Service). (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 1/24/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/19/2017. (rtm, )
December 18, 2017 Setting Deadlines as to #1159 MOTION for Order to Show Cause . Motion set for 1/16/2018 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
December 18, 2017 Filing 1160 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/18/2017. Consent Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder CARL NAMI, JR..) (rtm, )
December 18, 2017 Filing 1159 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/18/2017 @3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/16/17. (js)
November 16, 2017 Filing 1157 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler/Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/16/2017. (Court Reporter: Karen Friedlander) (js)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1156 MDL TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED the conference call scheduled on November 16, 2017 [Doc. No. 1155] is just for lead counsel. All counsel need not participate on the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/9/17. (Schneider, Joel)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 MDL TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference on November 16, 2017 at 1:30 p.m.. Plaintiffs' counsel shall arrange the telephone call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on November 9, 2017. (jk)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1154 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 37 REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL CENSUS OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/20/17. (js)
September 18, 2017 Filing 1153 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler/Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/18/2017. (Court Reporter: Carl Nami, Jr.) (js)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 MDL TEXT ORDER The Court has converted the in-person status conference previously scheduled on September 18, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. to a telephone status conference. Plaintiffs' counsel shall arrange the telephone call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on September 13, 2017. (jk)
September 11, 2017 Filing 1151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler/Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held off the record on 9/11/2017. (Court Reporter: Carl Nami, Jr.)(on standby) (js)
September 1, 2017 Filing 1150 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler/Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Conference held on 9/1/2017. (Court Reporter Karen Friedlander - on standby.) (bf, )
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 ORDER, The Court will conduct a telephone status conference On September 11, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. Ms. Sharko shall arrange the telephone call. The Court will also conduct an in-person conference on September 18, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4D, before the Honorable Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/1/17. (js)
August 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Conference held on 8/28/2017. (tf, )
August 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler: Telephone Conference held on 8/28/2017. (lm)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 36 APPOINTMENT OF A PRO SE REPRESENTATIVE. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/23/17. (js)
August 22, 2017 Filing 1147 Short Form Complaint by Earniece Foster, Jerry Foster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Coversheet)(CAMPBELL, SHEILA) Modified on 8/23/2017 (dd).17-6336RBK/JS
August 22, 2017 Filing 1146 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLATER, ADAM)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 35 COMMON BENEFIT ASSESSMENTS TO COMPENSATE PARTICIPATING COUNSEL FOR COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND RELATED COSTS. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/15/17. (js)
August 15, 2017 Filing 1144 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler: Status Conference held on 8/15/2017. Case Management Order #35 (Common Benefit Assessments) to be entered. (Court Reporter: Carl Nami, Jr.) (js)
August 7, 2017 Filing 1143 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/1/17, before Judge Kugler and Judge Schneider. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 8/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2017. (dd, )
August 2, 2017 Filing 1142 AFFIDAVIT of Marina Corodemus by NORMAN BLOCK. (SLATER, ADAM)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 ORDER - Ordered any objection to Motion #1134 shall be filed on or before NOON (EDT) August 11, 2017; Should there be any written objections filed, the Court will hold a Hearing on August 15, 2017, at 2:00 PM (EDT); Should there be no objections, the Court will enter the Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/2/17. (dd, )
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 34 REGARDING PRIMA FACIE EVIDENCE OF USAGE, INJURY AND CAUSATION REQUIREMENTS FOR PENDING CASES NOT PARTICIPATING IN THE OLMESARTAN PRODUCTS RESOLUTION PROGRAM AND NEWLY FILED OR TRANSFERRED CASES. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/1/17. (js)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 33 REGARDING STAY. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/1/17. (js)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 32 REGARDING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/1/17. (js)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 31. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/1/17. (js)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1136 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 30 REGARDING CENSUS OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/1/17. (js)
August 1, 2017 Filing 1135 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler & Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 8/1/2017. Overview of Master Settlement Agreement placed on the record. Case Management Order #30 (Census Order) to be entered. Case Management Order #31 (Special Master Order) to be entered. Case Management Order #32 (Settlement Deadlines) to be entered. Case Management Order #33 (Stay Order) to be entered. Case Management Order #34 (Implementation Order) to be entered. Hearing on Application for Common Benefit Fund set for August 15, 2017 at l0:00 AM. (Court Reporter: Carl Nami, Jr.) (js) Modified on 8/1/2017 (tf, ).
July 28, 2017 Setting Deadlines as to #1134 MOTION Approve Order Establishing a Benicar Common Benefit Fund to Compensate and Reimburse Participating Counsel for Common Benefit Fees and Related Costs /This Document Relates to All Cases. Motion set for 8/21/2017 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
July 28, 2017 Filing 1134 MOTION Approve Order Establishing a Benicar Common Benefit Fund to Compensate and Reimburse Participating Counsel for Common Benefit Fees and Related Costs /This Document Relates to All Cases by BENICAR (OLMESARTAN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 MDL TEXT ORDER: In-person Status Conference set for 8/1/2017 at 10:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler. So Ordered by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/24/2017. (lm)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 ORDER, the Daubert hearings shall commence on August 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/28/17. (js)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 ORDER re Summary Judgments Motions (Civil Action No: 1:16CV05371). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/22/2017. (tf, )
May 22, 2017 Filing 1130 OPINION (Civil Action No: 1:16CV05371). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/22/2017. (tf, )
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 ORDER that counsel's application is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Daubert hearings shall begin on 7/17/2017. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/12/2017. (TH, )
May 1, 2017 Filing 1128 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by William H. von Eberstein re #1075 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of James Alan Popp, D.V.M., Ph.D. (Relates to All Cases) (COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1127 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DORIS ALEXANDER re #1073 MOTION , #1074 MOTION (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Certificate of Service, #13 Exhibit)(NIGH, DANIEL)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1126 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by DORIS ALEXANDER re #1073 MOTION , #1074 MOTION (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Certificate of Service)(NIGH, DANIEL)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1125 RESPONSE in Support filed by VERONICA ABDULLAHI re #1068 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Marianne C. Mann (RESNICK, STEVEN)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1124 BRIEF in Support filed by PAUL WAYNE LEWIS re #1076 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Jerrold Turner, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1123 BRIEF in Support filed by PAUL WAYNE LEWIS re #1077 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Keith Wilson, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1122 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #1071 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1121 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #1066 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Plaintiffs' Experts Drs. Daniel Leffler and Benjamin Lebwohl (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit CC-GG, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1120 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #1070 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Stephen Lagana, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1119 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #1065 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. David Kessler (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit S-U, #3 Certification)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1118 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #1069 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Susan Hutfless, Ph.D. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit GG-HH, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1117 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MARK YEAGER re #1069 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Susan Hutfless, Ph.D. This Filing Relates to All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Tara D. Sutton, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit Exhibit 45)(KESSLER, RAYNA)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1116 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #1077 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Keith Wilson, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit A-B, #3 Exhibit C-D, #4 Exhibit E-F, #5 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1115 BRIEF in Opposition filed by LAMAR WILLIAMS re #1066 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Plaintiffs' Experts Drs. Daniel Leffler and Benjamin Lebwohl this filing relates to all Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certification Tara D. Sutton, #2 Exhibit #1, Part 1, #3 Exhibit #1, Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 and 4, #6 Exhibit 5 and 6, #7 Exhibit 7 and 8, #8 Exhibit 9 and 10, #9 Exhibit 11 and 12, #10 Exhibit 13 and 14, #11 Exhibit 15 and 16, #12 Exhibit 17 and 18, #13 Exhibit 19 and 20, #14 Exhibit 21 and 22, #15 Exhibit 23 and 24, #16 Exhibit 25 and 26, #17 Exhibit 27 and 28, #18 Exhibit 29 and 30, #19 Exhibit 31 and 32, #20 Exhibit 33 and 34, #21 Exhibit 35 and 36, #22 Exhibit 37 and 38, #23 Exhibit 39 and 40, #24 Exhibit 41 and 42, #25 Exhibit 43 and 44, #26 Exhibit 45 and 46, #27 Exhibit 47 and 48, #28 Exhibit 49 and 50, #29 Exhibit 51 and 52, #30 Exhibit 53 thru 55, #31 Certificate of Service)(SUTTON, TARA)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1114 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #1075 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of James Alan Popp, D.V.M., Ph.D. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit A-D, #3 Exhibit E-F, #4 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1113 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #1068 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Marianne C. Mann (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1112 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #1076 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Jerrold Turner, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit A-E, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1111 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PAUL WAYNE LEWIS re #1071 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(SLATER, ADAM)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1110 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JOHN D. MORTON re #1065 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. David Kessler This Filing Relates to All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certification of Lexi J. Hazam, #2 Exhibit A; Kessler Report, #3 Exhibit B; Case, #4 Exhibit C-1; Kessler Depo, #5 Exhibit C-2; Kessler Depo, #6 Exhibit D; FDA Drug Safety Comm, #7 Exhibit E; Schedule X, #8 Exhibit F; Reliance List, #9 Exhibit G; Article, #10 Exhibit H-1; Leffler Report, #11 Exhibit H-2; Leffler Report, #12 Exhibit I; Leffler Depo, #13 Exhibit J; Case, #14 Exhibit K; Hutfless Table 10, #15 Exhibit L; Strom Chap. 3, #16 Exhibit M; Article, #17 Exhibit N; Reference Manual, #18 Exhibit O; Case, #19 Exhibit P; Case, #20 Exhibit Q; Tina Ho Depo, #21 Exhibit R; Article, #22 Exhibit S; Risch Report, #23 Exhibit T; Article, #24 Exhibit U; Article, #25 Exhibit V; Article, #26 Exhibit W; Article, #27 Exhibit X; Article, #28 Exhibit Y; Article)(HAZAM, LEXI)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1109 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PAUL WAYNE LEWIS re #1066 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Plaintiffs' Experts Drs. Daniel Leffler and Benjamin Lebwohl (Attachments: #1 Certification of Adam M. Slater, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #3 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2-6, #5 Exhibit 7, Part 1, #6 Exhibit 7, Part 2, #7 Exhibit 7, Part 3, #8 Exhibit 7, Part 4, #9 Exhibit 7, Part 5, #10 Exhibit 8-11, #11 Exhibit 12-17, #12 Exhibit 18-21, #13 Exhibit 22-23, #14 Certification of Service)(SLATER, ADAM)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1108 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #1073 MOTION to Exclude Dr. Richard Hansen (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit A-D, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1107 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #1074 MOTION to Exclude Dr. Harvey Risch (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit A-K, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 21, 2017 Filing 1106 BRIEF in Opposition filed by pltfs' PAUL WAYNE LEWIS, et al re #1070 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Stephen Lagana, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Adam M. Slater, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 3, Part 1, #4 Exhibit 3, Part 2, #5 Exhibit 3, Part 3, #6 Exhibit 3, Part 4, #7 Exhibit 3, Part 5, #8 Exhibit 4-6, #9 Exhibit 7-8, #10 Certification of Service)(SLATER, ADAM) Modified on 4/21/2017 (js).
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 ORDER granting Plaintiff's (#9, 15-4669) Motion to Substitute Party. MICHAEL HESS added as Executor of the Estate of Helen L. Hess. HELEN L. HESS (15-4669) terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/10/2017. (TH, )
April 7, 2017 Filing 1104 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/5/2017, before Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER and JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 4/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2017. (tf, )
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice. MARY SAMATARO (16-2923) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/2017. (tf, )
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice. JESSIE TYLER (16-4321) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/2017. (tf, )
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice. CHERYL WELLS (16-4333) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/2017. (tf, )
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice. NICKIE JACKSON BOYKIN (16-4151) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/2017. (tf, )
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice. TERRY CAUSEY, SR (16-4403) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/2017. (tf, )
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice. BRENDA HUTSON (16-4231) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/2017. (tf, )
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice. AMY SHOOK (16-2989) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/2017. (TH, )
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, with prejudice; JOHNNY TALBOT (16-2994) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/17. (js)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice, DARRIN SIMS (16-3818) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/2017. (dmr)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, with prejudice; BILLY SADLER (16-4826) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/17. (js)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice, WILLIAM HUGHES (16-4238) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/2017. (dmr)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, with prejudice; WILLIE NASH, JR. (16-5015) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/17. (js)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice, ANNIE CURTIS (16-3207) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/2017. (dmr)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, with prejudice; NORWECHIE JONES (16-4276) terminated.Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/17. (js)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, with prejudice; MARSHELL HAYES (16-4656) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/17. (js)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice; the ESTATE OF BETTIE A. BRADLEY (16-3775) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/17. (js)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice. RENETTA INGRAM (16-5579) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/5/2017. (TH, )
April 5, 2017 Filing 1086 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Schneider: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/5/2017. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Carl Nami, Jr.) (TH, )
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 MDL TEXT ORDER It is hereby ORDERED the discovery and status conference on April 5, 2017 will be held via phone conference at 2:00 p.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on April 4, 2017. (jk)
April 4, 2017 Filing 1084 STATUS REPORT and Agenda by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 3, 2017 Filing 1083 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEBORAH CURRIE(16-5517). (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 3, 2017 Filing 1082 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BOBBYE WILLIS. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 3, 2017 Filing 1081 STIPULATION of Dismissal by WALTER MAY. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 3, 2017 Filing 1080 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BOBBIE FULTZ. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 3, 2017 Filing 1079 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEBORAH CURRIE(16-5517). (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 3, 2017 Filing 1078 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JEREMY CAUSEY. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 3, 2017 Setting Deadlines as to #1076 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Jerrold Turner, M.D. , #1077 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Keith Wilson, M.D. . Motions set for 5/15/2017 @9:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler. (js)
April 3, 2017 Filing 1077 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Keith Wilson, M.D. by PAUL WAYNE LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Brief, #2 Certification of Adam M. Slater, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #5 Exhibit 1, Part 3, #6 Exhibit 1, Part 4, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3-4, #9 Exhibit 5-6, #10 Exhibit 7-9, #11 Exhibit 10-13)(SLATER, ADAM)
April 3, 2017 Filing 1076 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Jerrold Turner, M.D. by PAUL WAYNE LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Brief, #2 Certification of Adam M. Slater, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #5 Exhibit 1, Part 3, #6 Exhibit 1, Part 4, #7 Exhibit 1, Part 5, #8 Exhibit 2-3, #9 Exhibit 4-6, #10 Exhibit 7-9, #11 Exhibit 10-12)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 31, 2017 Setting Deadlines as to #1070 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Stephen Lagana, M.D. , #1069 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Susan Hutfless, Ph.D. , #1066 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Plaintiffs' Experts Drs. Daniel Leffler and Benjamin Lebwohl , #1073 MOTION , #1074 MOTION , #1065 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. David Kessler , #1068 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Marianne C. Mann , #1075 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of James Alan Popp, D.V.M., Ph.D. , #1071 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motions set for 5/15/2017 @9:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler. (js)
March 31, 2017 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letters( #1067 and #1072 ) filed by ADAM M. SLATER on 3/31/17 were submitted incorrectly as Letters. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Motions USING "Motions". This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (js)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1075 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of James Alan Popp, D.V.M., Ph.D. by William H. von Eberstein. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1074 MOTION by DORIS ALEXANDER. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(NIGH, DANIEL)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1073 MOTION by DORIS ALEXANDER. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Certificate of Service)(NIGH, DANIEL)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1072 Letter from Adam M. Slater enclosing Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Jerrold Turner, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Jerrold Turner, M.D., #2 Plaintiffs' Brief in Support, #3 Certification of Adam M. Slater, #4 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #5 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #6 Exhibit 1, Part 3, #7 Exhibit 1, Part 4, #8 Exhibit 1, Part 5, #9 Exhibit 2-3, #10 Exhibit 4-6, #11 Exhibit 7-9, #12 Exhibit 10-12)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1071 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. Responses due by 4/21/2017 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Certification, #4 Exhibit A-D, #5 Exhibit E-G, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1070 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Stephen Lagana, M.D. by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit A-B, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1069 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Susan Hutfless, Ph.D. by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit A-K, #4 Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit M-FF, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1068 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Marianne C. Mann by VERONICA ABDULLAHI. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support, #2 Certification of Rayna Kessler, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(RESNICK, STEVEN)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1067 Letter from Adam M. Slater enclosing Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Keith Wilson, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Keith Wilson, M.D., #2 Brief in Support, #3 Certification of Adam M. Slater, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, part 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, part 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1, part 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1, part 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 3-4, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 5-6, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 7-9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10-13)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1066 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Plaintiffs' Experts Drs. Daniel Leffler and Benjamin Lebwohl by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit A-E, #4 Exhibit F-Q, #5 Exhibit R-BB, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1065 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. David Kessler by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit A-B, #4 Exhibit C-R, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 29, 2017 Filing 1064 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen M. Lagana, M.D., #2 Affidavit of Benjamin Lebwohl, M.D.)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 27, 2017 Filing 1063 STIPULATION of Dismissal by LEO HOECKER. (DEGREEFF, DAVID)
March 23, 2017 Filing 1062 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by EARSELL PHIPPS. (DEGREEFF, DAVID)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 CONSENT ORDER granting Plaintiff's (PICA 17cv620) leave to file a First Amended Short Form Complaint (attached hereto as Exhibit A) within 20 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/17/2017. (TH, )
March 16, 2017 Filing 1060 Letter from Holly Dolejsi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint)(DOLEJSI, HOLLY)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/13/2017. (TH, )
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 ORDER that the next general Status Conference will be held on 4/5/2017 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/10/2017. (TH, )
March 9, 2017 Filing 1058 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/8/17, before Judge Kugler and Schneider. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 3/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2017. (dd, )
March 8, 2017 Filing 1056 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Discovery Conference held on 3/8/2017. (Court Reporter: Carl Nami) (js)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT as to LINDA D WHITMIRE (16-4008). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/8/2017. (dmr)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to VENCINER C SAYLES. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/8/17. (js)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to AMANDA G. COOPER. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/8/17. (js)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to GLENNA WALKER. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/8/17. (js)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice, LUCY MITCHELL (15-4202) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/8/2017. (TH, )
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice, LARRY T WILLIAMSON (15-8021) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/8/2017. (TH, )
March 8, 2017 Filing 1049 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler/Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 3/8/2017. Ordered status conference set for April 5, 2017 at 2:00PM. (Court Reporter: Carl Nami, Jr.) (js)
March 7, 2017 Filing 1048 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by IDALENE OLDHAM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
March 7, 2017 Filing 1047 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by CLARENCE BRIGHT, TASHA BRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
March 7, 2017 Filing 1046 STATUS REPORT and Agenda by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 6, 2017 Filing 1045 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ERA SMITH. (NIGH, DANIEL)
March 6, 2017 Filing 1044 STIPULATION of Dismissal by TINA CHANDLER. (NIGH, DANIEL)
March 6, 2017 Filing 1043 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CHRISTIAN BLYTHE. (NIGH, DANIEL)
March 3, 2017 Filing 1042 Letter from Susan M. Sharko. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 2, 2017 Filing 1041 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq.. (SLATER, ADAM)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1040 Exhibit to #1039 Letter by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1039 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2/13/17 Letter, #2 Exhibit 2/15/17 Letter, #3 Exhibit 2/23/17 Letter, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 10. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/28/17. (js)
February 24, 2017 Filing 1037 Letter from Michael C. Zogby. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
February 21, 2017 Filing 1036 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Deposition)(SLATER, ADAM)
February 20, 2017 Filing 1035 NOTICE of Appearance by DEAN T. XENICK on behalf of LINDA JANNOT, ROBERT P JANNOT (XENICK, DEAN)
February 17, 2017 Filing 1034 NOTICE by DORIS ALEXANDER Amended Notice of Deposition for Dr. Richard Hansen (NIGH, DANIEL)
February 17, 2017 Filing 1033 NOTICE by DORIS ALEXANDER Amended Deposition Notice of Dr. Harvey Risch (NIGH, DANIEL)
February 17, 2017 Filing 1032 NOTICE by DORIS ALEXANDER Notice of Deposition of Dr. Harvey Risch (NIGH, DANIEL)
February 17, 2017 Filing 1031 NOTICE by DORIS ALEXANDER Notice of Deposition of Dr. Richard Hansen (NIGH, DANIEL)
February 16, 2017 Filing 1030 Letter from Christopher L. Coffin. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Take Videotaped Oral Deposition of Dr. James Popp)(COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
February 16, 2017 Filing 1029 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/25/2017, before Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER and JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 3/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2017. (tf, )
February 15, 2017 Filing 1028 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEAN ATKINSON. (HAUER, STACY)
February 15, 2017 Filing 1027 NOTICE by BEVERLY ADAMS Notice of Deposition of Marianne Mann (RESNICK, STEVEN)
February 14, 2017 Filing 1026 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Deposition)(SLATER, ADAM)
February 14, 2017 Filing 1025 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF RANDALL L. TACKETT, Ph.D. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
February 13, 2017 Filing 1024 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF SUSAN HUTFLESS, Ph.D. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 29A. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/7/17. (js)
February 3, 2017 Filing 1022 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF BENJAMIN LEBWOHL, M.D. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
February 2, 2017 Filing 1021 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF STEPHEN M. LAGANA, M.D. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 ORDER, the next general status conference will be held on March 8, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4D, before the Honorable Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/31/17. (js)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 OPINION AND ORDER denying #9 Motion to Remand (16-5371). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/30/2017. (tf, )
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 29. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/30/17. (js)
January 30, 2017 Filing 1017 Application for Refund of Fees (finance notified).. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pay.gov Receipt 1, #2 Exhibit B - Pay.gov Receipt 2)(ALTMAN, KEITH)
January 30, 2017 Filing 1016 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DR. DAVID KESSLER (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
January 27, 2017 Filing 1015 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DR. DANIEL LEFFLER (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 ORDER that Plaintiff's request for a 1 month extension to file a PFS before an Order to Show Cause be issued is GRANTED and the extension expires on 2/28/2017. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/25/2017. (TH, )
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 ORDER, Plaintiffs' request for a one-month extension to file a PFS before an Order to Show Cause be issued is GRANTED and that the extension expires on 28 February 2017. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/25/17. (js)
January 25, 2017 Filing 1012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler/Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 1/25/2017. Ordered status conference set for March 8, 2017 at 2:00PM. (Court Reporter: Carl Nami, Jr.) (js)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1011 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq. re: Agenda Item No. 10. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1010 STIPULATION of Dismissal by TERESA BOWEN, TRACY BOWEN. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1009 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ROSE FORD. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1008 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DAVID GRAHAM. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1007 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JOE GOODE, MARSHA GOODE. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1006 STIPULATION of Dismissal by PAUL TALLMAN. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1005 STIPULATION of Dismissal by NALLIE GILBERT. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1004 STIPULATION of Dismissal by SANDY D. LEE. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1003 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ORA COX. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1002 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CAROLYN DIXON, PHILLIP DIXON. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
January 24, 2017 Filing 1001 STATUS REPORT by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
January 23, 2017 Filing 1000 STIPULATION of Dismissal by WYONIA WILLIAMS. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 23, 2017 Filing 999 STIPULATION of Dismissal by STEVE SEAMAN. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 23, 2017 Filing 998 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BONNIE SCOTT. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 23, 2017 Filing 997 STIPULATION of Dismissal by RICHARD LASTER. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 23, 2017 Filing 996 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JAMES HOLLIDAY. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 23, 2017 Filing 995 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JIMMY HILL. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 23, 2017 Filing 994 STIPULATION of Dismissal by MAYLENE GORDON. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 23, 2017 Filing 993 STIPULATION of Dismissal by FELIX LIND FORNETT. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 23, 2017 Filing 992 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CAROLYN FLETCHER. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 23, 2017 Filing 991 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JOSEPH DEAN COLE, JR. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 23, 2017 Filing 990 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DELORIS CANNON. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 23, 2017 Filing 989 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JOHNETTE BETTS. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 23, 2017 Filing 988 STIPULATION of Dismissal by PATRICIA ARRINGTON. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 23, 2017 Filing 987 STIPULATION of Dismissal by RAY ARMSTRONG. (NIGH, DANIEL)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 986 LETTER ORDER, addressed to Ms. Sharko, Denying the request to reconsider the Text Order except for one clarification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/20/17. (js)
January 19, 2017 Filing 985 Letter from Susan M. Sharko re: 1/18/17 Text Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 984 MDL TEXT ORDER -- To the extent not already clear, it is hereby ORDERED a general status conference will be held in Courtroom 4D on January 25, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall advise the Court in advance of January 25 if a separate discovery conference to held at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3C is necessary or appropriate. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/19/17. (Schneider, Joel)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 983 MDL TEXT ORDER -- The Court having received plaintiffs' January 17, 2017 letter [Doc. No. 982]; and good cause existing for the entry of this Order, it is hereby ORDERED that by no later than January 24, 2017 (noon) defendants shall provide plaintiffs with the final identification of experts that will serve expert reports by the Court-Ordered deadline and proposed dates and locations for the depositions of the experts. All current scheduling deadlines shall remain in place. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/18/16. (Schneider, Joel)
January 17, 2017 Filing 982 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq.. (SLATER, ADAM)
January 17, 2017 Filing 981 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq.. (SLATER, ADAM)
January 13, 2017 Filing 980 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 979 Order of MDL Panel (CTO - 14) transferring certain action from the District of North Carolina Eastern; Case# 5:16-816 to this court. (dd, )
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ORDER Dismissing Complaint(Michelle Henker) with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/27/16. (js)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 977 ORDER Dismissing Complaint(Linda Burkhart) with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/27/16. (js)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 976 ORDER Dismissing Complaint(Michael Anthony). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/27/16. (js)
December 23, 2016 Filing 975 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq. Re: Henker Order to Show Cause. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
December 22, 2016 Filing 974 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq. Re: Orders to Show Cause returnable December 21, 2016. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 973 AMENDED LETTER ORDER, Re: #969 Letter Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/22/16. (js)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 972 Letter, addressed to Counsel, Re: Orders to Show Cause returnable 12/21/16. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/21/16. (js)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 971 ORDER(16-3446), plaintiff's motion is GRANTED and Cleaster A. Love, Administrator of the Estate of Pearlene M. Love, is substituted as the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/20/16. (js)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 970 ORDER(16-4205), that plaintiffs motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Amended/Corrected Short Form Complaint [Doc. No. 3-1] shall be deemed to be filed and served the date of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/20/16. (js)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 969 LETTER ORDER, addressed to Counsel, Re: Protected Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/20/16. (js)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 968 ORDER Denying as moot #619 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/20/16. (js)
December 16, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Conference held on 12/16/2016. (lm) Modified on 12/30/2016 (se).
December 15, 2016 Filing 967 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by JOAN BAKER. (CHAMBERS, JASON)
December 14, 2016 Filing 966 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney MALLORY JORDAN MANGOLD terminated. Attorney DANIEL A. NIGH for Marian Love, DANIEL A. NIGH for Rodgers Love, added.. (NIGH, DANIEL)
December 13, 2016 Filing 965 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by DIXIE ALES, et al (NIGH, DANIEL) (Main Document 965 replaced on 12/13/2016) (js). Modified on 12/13/2016 (js).
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 964 ORDER RE-OPENING CASE 16cv3174(RBK)(Margaret Wooten). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/13/16. (js)
December 6, 2016 Filing 963 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/30/2016, before Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER and JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (tf, )
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 962 ORDER, To the extent any plaintiff requests to file an amended complaint or amended short form complaint, a copy of the proposed amended pleading shall first be served on defense counsel. Thereafter, the parties shall meet and confer in-person or by phone to determine if defendants will consent to the amendment. If consent is given, the moving party shall prepare a Consent Order to be sent to the Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/1/16. (js)
December 1, 2016 Filing 961 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
December 1, 2016 Filing 960 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 959 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice as to Elizabeth Nicole Wafer. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/30/2016. (TH, )
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 958 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice as to Ronald J. Sanders. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/30/2016. (TH, )
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 957 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice as to Cheurlie Russell. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/30/2016. (TH, )
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 956 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice as to Morris Rentie, Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/30/2016. (TH, )
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 955 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT with prejudice as to Arthur J. Harris. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/30/2016. (TH, ) Modified on 12/1/2016 (TH).
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 954 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE THE COMPLAINT OF MARGARET WOOTEN. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/30/16. (js)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 953 ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE AS TO PLTF. SHAWN HARMON. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/30/16. (js)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 952 LETTER ORDER, Granting the request to extend the deadline to report any disputes to the Court by 12/16/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/30/16. (js)
November 30, 2016 Filing 951 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler/Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/30/2016. Status conference set for December 21, 2016 at 2:00PM. (Court Reporter: Carl Nami, Jr.) (js)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 950 MDL TEXT ORDER The Court having received counsel's November 22, 2016 letter [Doc. No. 948], it is hereby ORDERED the November 30, 2016 discovery conference with Judge Schneider is CANCELED. The in-person status conference with Judge Kugler on November 30, 2016 at 2:00 p.m., has been converted to a telephone status conference. Plaintiffs' counsel shall arrange the call to Judge Kugler's Chambers. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on November 28, 2016. (jk)
November 28, 2016 Filing 949 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq. re: deadlines. (SLATER, ADAM)
November 22, 2016 Filing 948 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq. re: November 30, 2016 Conference. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
November 22, 2016 Filing 947 STATUS REPORT by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 946 MDL TEXT ORDER -- The court having received counsel's November 16, 2016 letter [Doc. No. 945], it is hereby ORDERED the status conference call scheduled on November 18, 2016 is POSTPONED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/17/16. (Schneider, Joel)
November 16, 2016 Filing 945 Letter from Michael C. Zogby, Esq.. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
November 9, 2016 Filing 944 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JOYCE ROBBINS WYNNE. (NIGH, DANIEL)
November 9, 2016 Filing 943 STIPULATION of Dismissal by MARSHA BETH PEEVY. (NIGH, DANIEL)
November 9, 2016 Filing 942 STIPULATION of Dismissal by LINDA IBEX. (NIGH, DANIEL)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 941 OPINION re #938 Order. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/8/2016. (TH, )
November 2, 2016 Filing 940 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/26/2016, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Farrell (856-318-6100). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 11/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2017. (tf, )
November 2, 2016 Filing 939 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/26/2016, before Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER and JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 11/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2017. (tf, )
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 938 ORDER, Plaintiffs' request for leave to serve a Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Requests for Admissions related to general causation issues is DENIED without prejudice, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/31/16. (js)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER REGARDING PROTOCOL FOR OBTAINING AND USING PATHOLOGY SLIDES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/26/16. (js)
October 26, 2016 Filing 936 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Discovery Conference held on 10/26/2016. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Carol Farrell) (js)
October 26, 2016 Filing 935 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler/Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 10/26/2016. Ordered status conferences set for November 30, 2016 at 2:00PM and December 21, 2016 at 2:00PM. (Court Reporter: Carl Nami, Jr.) (js)
October 25, 2016 Filing 934 Letter from Christopher L. Coffin. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Position, #2 Plaintiffs' RFA Regarding General Causation)(COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
October 25, 2016 Filing 933 STATUS REPORT by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
October 20, 2016 Filing 932 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
October 19, 2016 Filing 931 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq. enclosing proposed form of Order re pathology protocol. (Attachments: #1 Proposed form of Order)(SLATER, ADAM)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 930 ORDER, By October 28, 2016, defendants shall identify their deposition confidentiality designations regarding performance evaluation testimony. Plaintiffs shall respond by November 11, 2016. Thereafter the parties shall meet and confer regarding their disputes. By November 18, 2016, defendants shall provide the Court with a list of the page and line numbers in dispute with copies of the referenced deposition testimony. The Court will review the testimony in camera, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/18/16. (js)
October 14, 2016 Filing 929 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Discovery Conference held on 10/14/2016. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: E.C.R.) (js)
October 14, 2016 Filing 928 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY KATHRYN HAUER on behalf of BRENDA L. ABRAM, RICHARD E. ALLEN, SR., MARGARET A ANDREWS, MARK A. AROCHA, BERNIETA R. ASHBROOK, BERNICE H. ATKINSON, JEFFREY A AULT, JEFF D. BAGLEY, SANDRA BELL, PAMELLA R. BERRYMAN, ROSEMARY C. BLOCK, RACHEL L. BONNETTE, FANNIE BOYD, MARGARET BROWN, DOROTHY BUFORD, TERRY L. BURKS, SUZANNE M. CALABRESE, ROBERT D. CAMPBELL, JR, JOHN V. CASCIO, NADINE CHANEY, LOVIE I. CHENEY, ELOISE M. CIEPIELA, LINDA CLAMPITT-CRIM, ALTON D. CLARK, JULIA A. COLICHIO, DENNIS COMBS, JOE W. CROWNOVER, SANDI K. CURRAN, THOMAS E. DARLING, ROBIN E. DE LA LLAMA, DONALD DELONG, ZELDA M. DOBBS, LARRY DOWELL, LAURA M. DUNN, RICHARD H. EBERS, GEORGE T. EDINGER, GARY L. EDWARDS, PATEESE ELLIDRIDGE(15-5400), CHERYL EMLER, JASON L. FARIS, NORMAN FASZLER, RITA FAUCETT, FRANCES GARRETT, JAMES GASTON, SARAH J. GATES, TERENCE J. GEISSLER, BLANCA A. GORDON, DARLENE C. GRAHAM, JAMES GREEN, LEON J. HALLAERT, MARY C. HALLIBURTON, DONTA L. HARRIS, PAT HENDERSON, STEVEN HENSLEY, HELEN L. HESS, GREGORY W. HILL, ANTHONY D. HILL, SR., DEANISE HOLDER, FELIX M. HOLMES, CHARLES HUGHES, OMECA L. HUMPHREY, JENNIFER HUNT, LINDA M. JOHNSON, DARREN E. JORDAN, NORMAN L. JOSEPH, KRUTHA E. KEITH, HORST W. KWECH, ELIZABETH LANGAN, SANDRA S. LEHMAN, SANDRA LENOIR, JAMES T. LIPANOVICH, JANUETTA LONDON, DOUGLAS J. LYNCH, KEITH R. MAHER, LYNNETTE A. MANNIE, MARY M. MASKELL-CIAMPA, SHANNON D. MAYNARD, DEBORAH E. MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINE MCHENRY, KAREN MOORE, ABDUL H. MUHAMMAD, WILLIE L. NASH, LORENZO NORMAN, JAMES O'NEAL, BILLY D. PATTERSON, MARLENE PATTERSON, ALMA J. PIERSON, CHRISTOPHE L. PIRET, JEFFREY D. POINDEXTER, CARLOS RAMOS, CAROL ROBINSON, DELLA ROBINSON, RONALD J. SANDERS, VERNELL SANDS, VIRGINIA A. SCANLAN, CHARLES F. SCOGGINS, MICHELLE SEARS, HERMAN L. SHEARS, MARIE SHIRES, RONALD E. SMITH, VICKI M. SMITH, WAYNE F. STONE, ANTHONY B. STRONG, CHELSEA STURGEON, MAUREEN L. THOMAS, CHRISTOPHER WAMBLE, MICHAEL W. WATSON, GEORGE D. WEAVER, CATHERINE WEBSTER, CHARLES R. WEEMS, JOANNE WERNER, EDWARD E. WHEATLEY, TERRI WHITE, LINDA D WHITMIRE, ROGER D. WHITMORE, ALBERT R. WILLARD, TANYA R. WILLIAMS, MAXINE T. ZELEZNICK (HAUER, STACY)
October 13, 2016 Filing 927 STATUS REPORT by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
October 13, 2016 Filing 926 Letter from Adam M. Slater re filing documents under seal. (SLATER, ADAM)
October 13, 2016 Filing 925 Letter from Adam M. Slater re general causation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 11-14)(SLATER, ADAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 12, 2016 Filing 924 Letter from Tara D. Sutton. (SUTTON, TARA)
October 12, 2016 Filing 923 Letter from Plaintiffs' re one-day extension (revised). (SLATER, ADAM)
October 12, 2016 Filing 922 Letter from Plaintiffs' re one-day extension. (SLATER, ADAM)
October 12, 2016 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - STEPHEN J. RESNICK, does not have a correct e-mail address listed with the court and is not receiving his/her notices of electronic filing in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1 and court procedures, counsel and unrepresented parties are required to notify the court of any mailing or e-mail address changes. The court has deleted the invalid e-mail address. Attorneys should review the ECF link on our web site for information on maintaining your account and unrepresented parties, or those attorneys without access to maintaining their account, should notice the Clerk. (th, )
October 11, 2016 Filing 921 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
October 10, 2016 Filing 920 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq. regarding deposition designations. (SLATER, ADAM)
October 7, 2016 Filing 919 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 918 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Denying #886 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/4/16. (js)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 917 AMENDED ORDER, Re: #913 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/3/16. (js)
October 3, 2016 Filing 916 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. AMENDED NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DR. KENNETH STEVENS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
October 3, 2016 Filing 915 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/28/2016, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Farrell (856-318-6100). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 10/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2017. (tf, )
September 30, 2016 Filing 914 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq. withdrawing Motion to Seal. (SLATER, ADAM)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 913 ORDER, The parties' Pathology Protocol shall start with one coated unstained slide and the other items the parties agreed to, without prejudice to the parties' right to request additional unstained slides, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/30/16. (js)
September 30, 2016 Filing 912 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/28/2016, before Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER and JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 10/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2016. (tf, )
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 910 MDL TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED that by no later than October 4, 2016, defendants shall produce the document(s) referenced on page 1 of plaintiffs' September 29, 2016 letter [Doc. No. 908] concerning the European Advisory Board of Key Opinion Leaders. To the extent the document(s) has already been produced, defendants shall identify the Bates numbers. It is further ORDERED the parties' submissions to the Court shall refrain from including "static" that is not relevant to the merits of the issues to be addressed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/30/16. (Schneider, Joel)
September 29, 2016 Filing 909 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
September 29, 2016 Filing 908 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq. re production of documents. (SLATER, ADAM)
September 28, 2016 Filing 911 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Discovery Conference held on 9/28/2016, Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2016 re #886 MOTION to Compel. Ordered Motion DENIED. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Carol Farrell) (js)
September 28, 2016 Filing 907 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/15/2016, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC ((856) 435-7172). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 10/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2016. (tf, )
September 28, 2016 Filing 906 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler: Status Conference held on 9/28/2016. Ordered status conference set for October 26, 2016 at 2:00PM. (Court Reporter: Carl Nami, Jr.) (js)
September 28, 2016 Filing 905 NOTICE by REXANNE STILES of Subpoena Duces Tecum for Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Troy Hoffman (Attachments: #1 Supplement Subpoena)(WEINBERGER, PETER)
September 28, 2016 Filing 904 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DORIS JOSEPH. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
September 28, 2016 Filing 903 STATUS REPORT re-filed to included Exhibit A by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Pathology Protocol)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
September 27, 2016 Filing 902 STATUS REPORT by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
September 26, 2016 Filing 901 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC. re #886 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jessica L. Brennan, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Declaration of Eric Schwarz, #6 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
September 26, 2016 Filing 900 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
September 23, 2016 Filing 899 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/14/2016, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC ((856) 435-7172). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 10/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2016. (tf, )
September 23, 2016 Filing 898 Letter from Stacy K. Hauer, Esq.. (HAUER, STACY)
September 22, 2016 Filing 897 Letter from Adam M. Slater regarding Exhibits Subject to Motion to Seal re #892 MOTION to Seal certain exhibits accompanying Certification of Adam M. Slater in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Depositions of Stephan Freudenthaler and Ulf Stellmacher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - pages 1-11, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - pages 12-18, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - pages 19-21, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - pages 22-23, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 6-9, 12, 16, 20)(SLATER, ADAM)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 896 MDL TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED defendants' response to plaintiffs' Motion to Compel [Doc. No. 886] shall be filed no later than 5:00 p.m. on September 26, 2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/22/16. (Schneider, Joel)
September 21, 2016 Setting Deadlines as to #892 MOTION to Seal certain exhibits accompanying Certification of Adam M. Slater in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Depositions of Stephan Freudenthaler and Ulf Stellmacher. Motion set for 10/17/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
September 21, 2016 Filing 895 NOTICE by SUSAN SUTTON of Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Piper Lawson (WEINBERGER, PETER)
September 21, 2016 Filing 894 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
September 21, 2016 Filing 893 NOTICE by PATRICIA MORGAN of Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Piper Lawson (WEINBERGER, PETER)
September 21, 2016 Filing 892 MOTION to Seal certain exhibits accompanying Certification of Adam M. Slater in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Depositions of Stephan Freudenthaler and Ulf Stellmacher by BENICAR (OLMESARTAN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Certification of Service)(SLATER, ADAM)
September 21, 2016 Filing 891 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq. re: discovery issues. (SLATER, ADAM)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 890 ORDER, The current deadlines to serve expert reports [CMO No. 26, Doc. No. #626 ] only applies to expert reports addressing general and specific causation issues, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/19/16. (js)
September 15, 2016 Filing 889 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Discovery Conference held via telephone on 9/15/2016. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: E.C.R.) (js)
September 15, 2016 Filing 888 NOTICE to Take Videotaped Oral Deposition (DOLEJSI, HOLLY)
September 14, 2016 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard the quality control message sent on 9/14/16, Re: ADAM M. SLATER. (js)
September 14, 2016 Setting Deadlines as to #886 MOTION to Compel. Motion set for 10/17/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
September 14, 2016 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter #886 filed by ADAM M. SLATER on 9/14/16 was submitted incorrectly as a "Letter". PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Motion to Compel USING "Motions". This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. Please re-file. (js)
September 14, 2016 Filing 887 STATUS REPORT by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
September 14, 2016 Filing 886 Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs from Adam M. Slater. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Depositions of Stephan Freudenthaler and Ulf Stellmacher, #2 Certification Certification of Adam M. Slater, #3 Exhibit Exhibits, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(SLATER, ADAM) Modified on 9/15/2016 (js).
September 14, 2016 Filing 885 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/30/16, before Judge Kugler and Magistrate Judge Schneider. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 10/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2016. (dd, )
September 13, 2016 Filing 884 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/30/16, before Judge Schneider. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 10/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2016. (dd, )
September 13, 2016 Filing 883 NOTICE by ALLEN PRIEST to Take Videotaped oral Deposition (DOLEJSI, HOLLY)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 882 MDL TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED that the conference call referred to in the September 13, 2016 Order [Doc. No. 881] will take place on September 15, 2016 at 4:00 p.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/13/16. (Schneider, Joel)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 881 MDL TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED that the issues raised in plaintiffs' September 12, 2016 [Doc. No. 880] letter to the Court will be addressed during the scheduled conference call on September 14, 2016 at 4:00 p.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/13/16. (Schneider, Joel)
September 12, 2016 Filing 880 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SLATER, ADAM)
September 8, 2016 Filing 879 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SUBPOENA and NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION of DR. JONATHAN ROTKER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
September 8, 2016 Filing 878 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SUBPOENA and NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION of DR. MATTHEW BRUST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 877 MDL TEXT ORDER Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court has changed the TIME ONLY of the discovery conference previously set for September 28, 2016 at 1:30 p.m., to 2:00 p.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on September 6, 2016. (jk)
September 2, 2016 Filing 876 CTO-13 Order of MDL Panel transferring certain action from the District of Texas Eastern; Case# 16-329 to this court. (dd, )
September 1, 2016 Filing 875 NOTICE by PATRICIA MORGAN (NIGH, DANIEL)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 874 ORDER confirming the Court's rulings from 8/30/2016 Discovery Conference re #852 Status Report. Plaintiff's are granted leave to file a Motion to Compel Discovery by 9/14/2016. Discovery Conference set for 9/28/2016 1:30 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Interim Discovery Conference Call set for 9/15/2016 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/1/2016. (TH, )
August 31, 2016 Filing 873 NOTICE by MICHELLE PHILLIPS Amended Notice of Deposition of John DeGuzman (COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 872 ORDER denying #847 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time, #848 Cross-Motion for Reconsideration and #864 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/31/2016. (tf, )
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 871 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on September 28, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/31/16. (js)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 870 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT; TIFFANY M. POINTER (16-176) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/31/16. (js)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 869 ORDER dismissing with prejudice 16-cv-157, SANDRA WILSON terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/31/2016. (dmr)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 868 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT; EILEEN BENNETT (15-8965) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/31/16. (js)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT; CANDI HICKEY (15-8736) and KURT E. HICKEY (15-8736) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/31/16. (js)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER dismissing case #16-181 with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/31/2016. (tf, )
August 31, 2016 Filing 865 NOTICE by MICHELLE PHILLIPS Notice of Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Subpoena To Testify at a Deposition)(COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
August 30, 2016 Setting Deadlines as to #864 MOTION re #849 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Motion set for 10/3/2016 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
August 30, 2016 Filing 864 MOTION re #849 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, by MARY MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(DENTON, ROGER)
August 30, 2016 Filing 863 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DARREL STILES (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 30, 2016 Filing 862 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUBPOENA and NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION of DR. MICHAEL GRUENEBAUM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 30, 2016 Filing 861 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUBPOENA and NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION of DR. DONNA GRAESSLE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 30, 2016 Filing 860 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler: Status Conference held on 8/30/2016, ( Next Status Conference set for 9/28/2016 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler.). (Court Reporter Carl Nami, Jr.) (bf, )
August 30, 2016 Filing 859 STIPULATION of Dismissal by NEHANVIN BOHDAN. (NIGH, DANIEL)
August 30, 2016 Filing 858 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Discovery Conference held on 8/30/2016. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Carl Nami) (js)
August 30, 2016 Filing 857 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. CROSS-NOTICE OF AMENDED DEPOSITION OF DR. MOHAMAD K. OBIDEEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 30, 2016 Filing 856 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. CROSS-NOTICE OF AMENDED DEPOSITION OF DR. MATTHEW J. MARKEY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 30, 2016 Filing 855 Letter from Roger C. Denton re #849 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #846 Response in Opposition to Motion, #845 Affidavit, #848 MOTION for Reconsideration, #847 MOTION for Leave to Late File. (DENTON, ROGER)
August 30, 2016 Filing 854 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney THOMAS R. HURD terminated. (HURD, THOMAS)
August 30, 2016 Filing 853 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney JAMES THOMAS DIMARCO terminated. (DIMARCO, JAMES)
August 29, 2016 Filing 852 STATUS REPORT by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
August 29, 2016 Filing 851 NOTICE by LAMAR WILLIAMS, LOIS WILLIAMS Amended Notice to Take Videotaped Oral Deposition (DOLEJSI, HOLLY)
August 29, 2016 Filing 850 NOTICE by LAMAR WILLIAMS, LOIS WILLIAMS Amended Notice to Take Videotaped Oral Deposition (DOLEJSI, HOLLY)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 849 ORDER granting #827 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration; the 7/27/2016 Order is revised in that the Motion to Remand is denied as moot as to Plaintiffs Mary Moore, Kenneth Wells, Deborah Currie, Marianne Saputo, James Hoffman and Paul Copenhaver. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/29/2016. (tf, )
August 26, 2016 Setting Deadlines as to #848 CROSS MOTION for Reconsideration, #847 MOTION for Leave to Late File. Motions set for 9/19/2016 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
August 26, 2016 Filing 848 CROSS MOTION for Reconsideration by MARY MOORE. (js)
August 26, 2016 Filing 847 MOTION for Leave to Late File by MARY MOORE. (js)
August 26, 2016 Filing 846 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by MARY MOORE re #827 MOTION for Reconsideration re #808 Order,,, #807 Opinion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A thru F, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(js)
August 26, 2016 Filing 845 AFFIDAVIT of Rachel A. Harris on behalf of the plaintiffs, Re: Technical Failures. (js)
August 24, 2016 Filing 844 NOTICE by MICHELLE PHILLIPS (Notice of Deposition of John DeGuzman) (COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
August 24, 2016 Filing 843 NOTICE by SHIRLEY LOVELADY (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(NIGH, DANIEL)
August 23, 2016 Filing 842 RESPONSE. (Attachments: #1 Statement Response to Plaintiffs Amended Notice of Videotaped 30(b)(6) Deposition)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
August 19, 2016 Filing 841 NOTICE by SHIRLEY LOVELADY (NIGH, DANIEL)
August 18, 2016 Filing 840 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Amended Deposition Notice)(SLATER, ADAM)
August 18, 2016 Filing 839 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Vicki Changet. (NIGH, DANIEL)
August 17, 2016 Filing 838 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Vicki L Changet. (NIGH, DANIEL)
August 17, 2016 Filing 837 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JEFFREY STRINGER. (NIGH, DANIEL)
August 17, 2016 Filing 836 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DR. R. RANDALL HEAVNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 17, 2016 Filing 835 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. AMENDED NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DR. YASSER RAYYAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 834 LETTER ORDER, defendants are granted an extra week to respond to the Court's August 9, 2016 Order. It is further ORDERED that to the extent an omnibus request is made to depose more than one treating and prescribing physician for a bellwether plaintiff, the request is DENIED. As the parties know, the Court will address specific requests if good cause is shown to depose more than one treating and prescribing physician. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/16/16. (js)
August 15, 2016 Filing 833 Letter from Michael C. Zogby, Esq.. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 15, 2016 Filing 832 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DR. MARK KUSHNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 12, 2016 Filing 831 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. CROSS-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DR. MOHAMAD K. OBIDEEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 12, 2016 Filing 830 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. CROSS-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DR. MATTHEW J. MARKEY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 12, 2016 Filing 829 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by DONALD BURKETT, DONNA BURKETT. (bf, )
August 9, 2016 Filing 828 DECLARATION of William Meury with Exhibit 1 re #827 MOTION for Reconsideration re #808 Order,,, #807 Opinion by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
August 9, 2016 Setting Deadlines as to #827 MOTION for Reconsideration re #808 Order, #807 Opinion. Motion set for 9/6/2016 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
August 9, 2016 Filing 827 MOTION for Reconsideration re #808 Order,,, #807 Opinion by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 826 MDL TEXT ORDER The Court having received defendants' letter application [Doc. No. 825]; and good cause existing to enter this Order, it is hereby ORDERED that by August 16, 2016, defendants shall show cause why it would be an undue burden to provide the listed information in the subject Order for all prescribing and treating physicians for the bellwether plaintiffs. If available, defendants shall also serve for the Court's in camera inspection a sample printout from a representative prescribing and treating physician. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on August 9, 2016. (jk)
August 5, 2016 Filing 825 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
August 5, 2016 Filing 824 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DR. MUSTAFA AMMAR (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 5, 2016 Filing 823 NOTICE by LAMAR WILLIAMS, LOIS WILLIAMS to take Videotaped Oral Deposition (DOLEJSI, HOLLY)
August 4, 2016 Filing 822 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUBPOENA and NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION of DR. YASSER RAYYAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 3, 2016 Filing 821 NOTICE to Take Videotaped Oral Deposition (DOLEJSI, HOLLY)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 820 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on August 30, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/2/16. (js)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 819 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on August 30, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/2/16. (js)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 818 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on August 30, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/2/16. (js)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on August 30, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/2/16. (js)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 815 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Hearing set for 8/30/2016 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler (16-1161). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/2/2016. (tf, )
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 814 ORDER, Defendants' request for leave to depose more than one treating or prescribing doctor for plaintiffs Patricia Morgan and Norman Black is DENIED. ORDERED that a discovery conference will be held with Magistrate Judge Schneider on August 30, 2016 at 1:00 p.m. before the general status conference that starts at 2:00 p.m. on the same date, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/2/16. (js)
August 2, 2016 Filing 813 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DR. CHRISTOPHER DYAS (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
August 1, 2016 Filing 816 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/27/2016, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Farrell (856-318-6100). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 8/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2016. (tf, )
July 29, 2016 Filing 812 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DR. DAVID MICKUS (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 28, 2016 Filing 810 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Discovery Conference held on 7/27/2016. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Carol Farrell) (js) Modified on 7/29/2016 (se). (Main Document 810 replaced on 7/29/2016) (se).
July 28, 2016 Filing 809 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Amended Notice to Take videotaped Oral Deposition of Glenn Gormley)(SLATER, ADAM)
July 27, 2016 Filing 811 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler: Status Conference held on 7/27/2016. (Court Reporter Karen Friedlander [on call.) (bf, )
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Docket #13) is hereby GRANTED as to Plaintiffs Mary Moore, Kenneth Wells, Deborah Currie, Iris Twelbeck, Claudette Woodlen, Cindy Adams, Eleanor Both, Barbara Cairoli, Von Duhart, Carol Hirschen, Darlene Justynski, Dimakis Kalogerakos, Zatiti Moody, Stephen Ratz, Joan Richardson, Bedelia Sanchez, Marianne Saputo, James Hoffman, George Ritzie, Paul Copenhaver, Judith Moebis, Geraldine Zanna, James Bittel, Gretchen Berenato, Patricia Brown, Arlene Jacobsen, Barrie White, Scott Ortega, Ralph Loree, Joseph Garofolo, Lisa Dannunzio, Lori Sickler, Carmen Simmons, Rita Vandergrift and Marion Poyner; Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Docket #13) is hereby DENIED AS MOOT in all other respects (15-8823). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/27/2016. (tf, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 807 OPINION (15-8823). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/27/2016. (tf, )
July 26, 2016 Filing 806 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq. re 07/27/16 Agenda. (SLATER, ADAM)
July 26, 2016 Filing 805 STATUS REPORT and Agenda by DAIICHI SANYKO, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
July 19, 2016 Filing 804 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF MARY ANN DAMIANI, M.D. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 18, 2016 Filing 803 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF AMELIA HARRIS (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 18, 2016 Filing 802 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUBPOENA and NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DR. ANDREA ANGELLUCI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 18, 2016 Filing 801 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUBPOENA and NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DR. KENNETH STEVENS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 800 MDL TEXT ORDER At the request of the parties, the Court has canceled the telephone discovery conference previously set for today, July 18, 2016 at 4:30 p.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on July 18, 2016. (jk)
July 15, 2016 Filing 799 Letter from Adam Slater to Judge Schneider re July 18 Conference. (SLATER, ADAM)
July 15, 2016 Filing 798 Letter from Michael C. Zogby. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 13, 2016 Filing 797 NOTICE by ALLEN PRIEST to Take Videotaped Oral Deposition (DOLEJSI, HOLLY)
July 13, 2016 Filing 796 NOTICE by ALLEN PRIEST to Take Videotaped Oral Deposition (DOLEJSI, HOLLY)
July 11, 2016 Filing 795 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ROBERT MIRAGLIA(16-3248). (NIGH, DANIEL)
July 11, 2016 Filing 794 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ROBERT MIRAGLIA(16-3248). (NIGH, DANIEL)
July 6, 2016 Filing 793 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF MITCHELL MORGAN (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 6, 2016 Filing 792 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PATRICIA MORGAN (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 6, 2016 Filing 791 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF SUSAN SUTTON (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 789 ORDER that Plaintiff Aletia Collins (15cv7700) Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/2016. (TH, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ORDER that Plaintiff Mark Carpenter's (15cv5369) Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/2016. (TH, ) Modified on 6/30/2016 (TH).
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 787 ORDER that Plaintiff Tiffany Williams'(15cv5030) Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/2016. (TH, ) Modified on 6/30/2016 (TH).
June 30, 2016 Filing 786 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/29/2016, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bob Tate (609-462-4384). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 7/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2016. (tf, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 785 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Hearing set for 8/30/2016 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler. (15-8727). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/2016. (tf, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Hearing set for 8/30/2016 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler (15-4737). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/2016. (tf, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 783 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on August 30, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67); IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause shall result in dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiff's Complaint and claims. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/16. (js)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 782 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on August 30, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, why Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67); IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause shall result in dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiffs' Complaint and claims. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/16. (js)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 781 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on August 30, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67); IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause shall result in dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiff's Complaint and claims. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/16. (js)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT (Civil No. 15-4962). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/2016. (tf, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 779 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to ANTHONY WALKER (15-4947) and SYLVIA WALKER (15-4947). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/2016. (dmr)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT (Civil No. 15-4501). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/2016. (tf, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to STEVEN WILLIAMS (15-4837) terminated.. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/2016. (dmr)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 776 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (Civil No. 15-5171). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/2016. (tf, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Hearing set for 8/30/2016 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler. (16-181). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/2016. (tf, )
June 30, 2016 Filing 774 Letter from Defendants. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
June 29, 2016 Filing 790 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler/Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 6/29/2016. (Court Reporter Carl Nami, Jr.) (bf, )
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 773 ORDER that a discovery conference call will be held on 7/18/2016 at 4:30 pm. ORDERED that the July monthly status conference will be held 7/27/2016 at 2:00 pm before Judge Kugler in Courtroom 4D, and a discovery conference will be held the same day in Courtroom 3C at 1:00 pm. ORDERED that the August monthly status conference will be held 8/30/2016 at 2:00 pm before Judge Kugler in Courtroom 4D, and a discovery conference will be held the same day in Courtroom 3C at 1:00 pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/29/2016. (TH, )
June 29, 2016 Filing 772 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Discovery Conference held on 6/29/2016. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Bob Tate) (TH, ) (Main Document 772 replaced on 7/5/2016) (se). Modified on 7/5/2016 (se).
June 28, 2016 Filing 771 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Joint Agenda by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
June 27, 2016 Filing 770 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF REXANNE STILES (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 27, 2016 Filing 769 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF KATHIE STAPLETON (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 27, 2016 Filing 768 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF STANLEY STAPLETON (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 24, 2016 Filing 767 Letter from Daiichi U.S. and Forest Defendants. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
June 17, 2016 Filing 766 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF MITCHELL MORGAN (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 17, 2016 Filing 765 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PATRICIA MORGAN (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 16, 2016 Filing 763 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC. re #762 Notice (Other) NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF NORMAN BLOCK (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 16, 2016 Filing 762 NOTICE by FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF NORMAN BLOCK (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 16, 2016 Filing 761 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF TAMARA BLOCK (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER RE: DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/15/16. (js)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER, The depositions of bellwether plaintiff Norman Block and his wife shall proceed as scheduled on June 23rd and 24th, 2016. Plaintiffs' request that defendants be required to complete their spreadsheets with information regarding defendants' marketing materials and SOPs is DENIED, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/15/16. (js)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 759 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28 (Bellwether Deposition Protocol). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/14/16. (js)
June 14, 2016 Filing 758 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/14/2016. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: E.C.R.) (js)
June 14, 2016 Filing 757 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SLATER, ADAM)
June 14, 2016 Filing 756 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF SHIRLEY LOVELADY (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 14, 2016 Filing 755 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF GARY LOVELADY (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 14, 2016 Filing 754 Letter from Susan M. Sharko regarding detail representatives and call notes. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
June 13, 2016 Filing 753 Letter from Susan M. Sharko regarding revised bellwether deposition protocol. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
June 13, 2016 Filing 752 Letter from Susan M. Sharko regarding bellwether deposition schedule. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
June 13, 2016 Filing 751 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Joint Agenda by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
June 9, 2016 Filing 750 Letter from Susan M. Sharko. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 749 LETTER ORDER, this issue shall be placed on the Agenda for the 6/14/16 conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/8/16. (js)
June 8, 2016 Filing 748 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF REXANNE STILES (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 8, 2016 Filing 747 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF AMELIA HARRIS (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to HEATHER A. RUSSELL (15-5408). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (dmr)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 745 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to MARYAN OSBORN (15-4918). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (dmr)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 744 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to MELVIN SHANDS (15-4877). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (dmr)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to CHRISTOPHER TROTTER (15-4587). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (dmr)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to ERNESTINE SWANSON (15-4955); party terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 741 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to ADAM WINTHROP (15-4925); party terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (15-6491). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 739 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (15-4622). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 738 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (15-4953). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to MARQUIS TAYLOR (15-4894); party terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 736 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to GARY WATTS (15-4876); party terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 735 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to ANITA SLONE (15-4845); party terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT as to Celeste Wallace for failure to file a PFS or otherwise Show Cause. ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (TH, )
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT as to Richard G. Wise, Jr. for failure to file a PFS or otherwise Show Cause. ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (TH, )
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to RONALD D. SIMON, JR. (15-4834); party terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 7, 2016 Filing 731 Letter from Susan M. Sharko. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
June 7, 2016 Filing 730 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF LOIS WILLIAMS (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 7, 2016 Filing 729 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF LAMAR WILLIAMS (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 7, 2016 Filing 728 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF SUSAN SUTTON (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 7, 2016 Filing 727 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF STANLEY STAPLETON (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 7, 2016 Filing 726 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF KATHIE STAPLETON (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 7, 2016 Filing 725 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DIANE REESE (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 7, 2016 Filing 724 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF ALLEN PRIEST (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 7, 2016 Filing 723 NOTICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF MICHELLE PHILLIPS (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to JEREMY J. NEER (15-5294); party terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to JAMES CRAIG (15-5214); party terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to MARION HAMILTON HOWARD (15-5125); party terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to FLORENCE JANE HAGER (15-5124); party terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 718 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to RICK COCKLIN, SR. (15-4915)and VIVIAN GOMEZ (15-4915); parties terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH COMPLAINT (15-4959). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (15-5364). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE at the Status Conference on 6/29/2016 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler.. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (15-5424). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 713 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (15-5446). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to FRANK HELMKE (15-4875) and REBECCA HELMKE (15-4875); parties terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 711 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to JACQUELINE HARVEY (15-4835) and MICHAEL HARVEY (15-4835); parties terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to GEORGE LESSANE (15-4567). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (dmr)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 709 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to ALLISON COX (15-4706) and CURTIS COX (15-4706); parties terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 708 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to DESSIE HUGHLEY (15-4688). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (dmr)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to ANTONIO CEGERS (15-4704); party terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to ANDREW FRITZ (15-4605); party terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 705 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to KAREN BURCHETT (15-5080).. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (dmr)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 704 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on June 29, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 703 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to DONALD BALLARD (15-4494); party terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 702 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE as to ANDREA MOORE (15-cv-04464-RBK-JS) and JULIAN MOORE (15-cv-04464-RBK-JS); parties terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 701 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (15-4682). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 700 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (15-4991). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 699 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (15-4683). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 698 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (15-5251). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 697 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE. (15-5012) Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 696 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (15-5129). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE (15-4922). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 694 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT (15-4722). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltfs SHOW CAUSE at the status conference on 6/29/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (dmr)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltfs SHOW CAUSE at the status conference on 6/29/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (dmr)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 691 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltfs SHOW CAUSE at the status conference on 6/29/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (dmr)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 690 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltfs SHOW CAUSE at the status conference on 6/29/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7.. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (dmr)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 689 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE at the Status Conference on 6/29/2016 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 688 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltfs SHOW CAUSE at the status conference on 6/29/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (dmr)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE at the Status Conference on 6/29/2016 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE at the Status Conference on 6/29/2016 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 685 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE at the Status Conference on 6/29/2016 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/2016. (tf, )
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 684 MDL ORDER Dismissing Complaint With Prejudice (15-4684), FELICIA COCHRAN (15-4684) and TIMOTHY COCHRAN (15-4684) terminated.. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/3/2016. (dmr)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 683 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 27. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/2/16. (js)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 682 TEXT ORDER -- The Court having received defendants' June 1, 2016 letter application [Doc. No. 680] regarding compliance with Paragraph 17(b) of the Stipulated Discovery Protective [Confidentiality] Order [Doc. No. 46], it is hereby ORDERED the issue shall be put on the agenda for the June 14, 2016 conference call. In the meantime, compliance with the objected to deadline in Paragraph 17(b) is STAYED pending further Order of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/2/16. (Schneider, Joel)
June 2, 2016 Filing 681 Letter from Christopher L. Coffin (regarding Timothy Cochran 1:15-cv-04684). (COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
June 1, 2016 Filing 680 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 679 DISCOVERY ORDER -Ordered Discovery Conference call to be held June 14, 2016 at 4:00 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/1/16. (dd, )
May 31, 2016 Filing 678 Letter from Adam Slater (Amended Deposition Notice of Antonia Wang). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Deposition Notice of Antonio Wang)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 31, 2016 Filing 677 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/26/2016, before Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER and JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 6/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2016. (tf, )
May 26, 2016 Filing 676 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler & Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 5/26/2016. (Court Reporter Carl Nami, Jr.) (bf, )
May 26, 2016 Filing 675 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ASHAY T. PRICE. (SNOWDON, PETER)
May 26, 2016 Filing 674 STIPULATION of Dismissal by TERECIA SMITH. (SNOWDON, PETER)
May 25, 2016 Filing 673 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7126547) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Maria G Sanchez.(SNAPKA, KATHRYN) Modified on 5/26/2016 (dd).16-3004RBK/JS
May 25, 2016 Filing 672 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Joint Agenda by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 671 MDL TEXT ORDER At the request of the parties, the May 26, 2016 discovery conference before Magistrate Judge Schneider will take place after the 2:00 p.m. general status conference with Honorable Robert B. Kugler. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on May 24, 2016. (jk)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 670 MDL TEXT ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that the discovery conference on May 26, 2016, before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider will be held at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3C. The general status conference will be held at 2:00 p.m. before the Honorable Robert B. Kugler. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on May 24, 2016. (jk)
May 23, 2016 Filing 669 STIPULATION of Dismissal by LISA A. SUDDUTH. (SNOWDON, PETER)
May 23, 2016 Filing 668 STIPULATION of Dismissal by PATRICIA O. JOHNSON. (NIGH, DANIEL)
May 23, 2016 Filing 667 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDY LAMMERS(15-4281). (NIGH, DANIEL)
May 23, 2016 Filing 666 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUSTIN WATKINS. (SNOWDON, PETER)
May 23, 2016 Filing 665 STIPULATION of Dismissal by COLTON B. WINEBARGER. (SNOWDON, PETER)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 664 ORDER granting Defendants #661 Letter request to amend the 5/13/2016 Order to remove the requirements to identify and provide additional versions of Sop R-500. ORDERED that to the extent Plaintiff's object they can raise the issue at the 5/26/2016 Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/20/2016. (TH, )
May 20, 2016 Filing 663 STIPULATION of Dismissal by THOMAS NEGAHNQUET. (SNOWDON, PETER)
May 20, 2016 Filing 662 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/18/2016, before Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER and JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 6/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2016. (tf, )
May 19, 2016 Filing 661 Letter from Susan S. Sharko regarding the Central Glossary. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
May 19, 2016 Filing 660 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Yuko Komokata). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Yuko Komokata)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 659 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Atsushi Sanbuissho). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Atsushi Sanbuissho)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 658 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Yoshihiro Emura). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Yoshihiro Emura)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 657 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Hanako Saito). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Hanako Saito)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 656 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Yasufumi Kuroda). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Yasufumi Kuroda)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 655 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Hironobu Saito). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Hironobu Saito)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 654 Letter from Adam Slater (30b6 Notice with regard to the Roadmap Study). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice with regard to the Roadmap Study)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 653 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Takahiko Kaku). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Takahiko Kaku)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 652 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Hisashi Nakagaki). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Hisashi Nakagaki)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 651 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Katsuyoshi Chiba). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Katsuyoshi Chiba)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 650 Letter from Adam Slater (Amended Deposition Notice of Wataru Takasaki). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Deposition Notice of Wataru Takasaki)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 649 Letter from Adam Slater (Amended Deposition Notice of Yasushi Hasebe). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Deposition Notice of Yasushi Hasebe)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 648 Letter from Adam Slater (Amended Deposition Notice of Makoto Mizuno). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Deposition Notice of Makoto Mizuno)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 647 Letter from Adam Slater (Amended Deposition Notice of Akiko Fukuma). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Deposition Notice of Akiko Fukuma)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 646 Letter from Adam Slater (Amended Deposition Notice of Donald Hinman). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Deposition Notice of Donald Hinman)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 645 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Kento Wada). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Kento Wada)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 644 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Kuniko Sata). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Kuniko Sata)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 643 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Shinichi Oda). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Shinichi Oda)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 642 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Yasushi Yoshigae). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Yasushi Yoshigae)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 641 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Akinori Nishiwaki). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Akinori Nishiwaki)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 18, 2016 Filing 640 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Wataru Takasaki). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Wataru Takasaki)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 18, 2016 Filing 639 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Donald Hinman). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Donald Hinman)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 18, 2016 Filing 638 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Yasushi Hasebe). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Yasushi Hasebe)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 18, 2016 Filing 637 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Akiko Fukuma). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Akiko Fukuma)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 18, 2016 Filing 636 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Makoto Mizuno). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Makoto Mizuno)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 18, 2016 Filing 635 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Andy Li). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice to Andy Li)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 18, 2016 Filing 634 Letter from Adam Slater (Subpoena to Andy Li). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena directed to Andy Li)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 17, 2016 Filing 633 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Mahmoud Ghazzi). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Dr. Ghazzi)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 17, 2016 Filing 632 STIPULATION of Dismissal by COREY PETRY. (SNOWDON, PETER)
May 17, 2016 Filing 631 STIPULATION of Dismissal by LINDA DUNN. (SNOWDON, PETER)
May 16, 2016 Filing 630 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JOSEPH J. BORDELON, III. (SNOWDON, PETER)
May 13, 2016 Filing 629 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/11/2016, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bob Tate (609-462-4384). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 6/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2016. (tf, )
May 13, 2016 Filing 628 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/29/2015, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bob Tate (609-462-4384). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 6/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2016. (tf, )
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER that Plaintiffs' request to depose Dr. Ghazzi in place of William Bailey is GRANTED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request asking Defendants to conduct a search of Dr. Ghazzis custodial files using the Court Ordered search terms is DENIED without prejudice. ORDERED that Defendants shall produce all final versions of SOP R-500, the Central Glossary of Terms, and the approximate 30-40 SOPs that plaintiffs identified, and the request for drafts of these documents is DENIED. ORDERED that the discovery conference presently scheduled on 5/26/2016 at 10:00 a.m. will instead be held immediately after the 2:00 p.m. general status conference the same date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/13/2016. (TH, )
May 13, 2016 Filing 625 Letter from Adam Slater (30b6 Notice for a Forest Representative). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 626 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 26. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/12/2016. (TH, )
May 11, 2016 Filing 624 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: In-Person Discovery Conference held on 5/11/2016. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Bob Tate.) (TH, )
May 10, 2016 Filing 623 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Joint Agenda by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
May 10, 2016 Filing 622 Letter from Susan M. Sharko regarding letter brief in opposition to plaintiffs request for the production of Dr. Mahmoud Ghazzis custodial documents re #620 Letter. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
May 9, 2016 Filing 621 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEBORAH J. RAKESTRAW. (SNOWDON, PETER)
May 6, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #619 MOTION to Seal. Motion set for 6/6/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (TH, )
May 5, 2016 Filing 620 Letter from Adam Slater (Letter brief in support of request for the deposition of Mahmoud Ghazzi). (SLATER, ADAM)
May 5, 2016 Filing 619 Motion to Temporarily Seal Letter Brief #620 by plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 4, 2016 Filing 618 Letter from Adam Slater (Second Amended Deposition Notice of Allen Feldman). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Deposition Notice of Allen Feldman)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 4, 2016 Filing 617 Letter from Susan M. Sharko regarding the deposition of Dr. Ghazzi. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
May 3, 2016 Filing 616 Letter from Adam Slater (Amended Deposition Notice of Crawford Parker). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Deposition Notice of Crawford Parker)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 3, 2016 Filing 615 Letter from Adam Slater (Amended Deposition Notice of Allen Feldman). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Deposition Notice of Allen Feldman)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER that Defendants' proposal to rotate interpreters at the depositions of Daiichi's Japanese witnesses [Doc. No. 597] is APPROVED. The next interim Discovery Conference will be held on 5/11/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/3/2016. (TH, )
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER that the depositions listed in the attached letter shall be deemed Court Ordered and shall not be postponed absent good cause and leave of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/3/2016. (TH, )
April 28, 2016 Filing 612 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/28/2016. In-Person Discovery Conference set for 5/11/16 at 2:00 pm. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (TH, )
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER granting #484 Motion to Vacate ; granting #484 Motion to Reopen Case; granting #485 Motion to Vacate ; granting #485 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/21/16. (js)
April 27, 2016 Filing 610 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Joint Agenda by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 27, 2016 Filing 609 STIPULATION of Dismissal by AVA WILLIAMS. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 27, 2016 Filing 608 STIPULATION of Dismissal by STEVE WICINSKI. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 27, 2016 Filing 607 STIPULATION of Dismissal by RONALD SHARPLEY. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 27, 2016 Filing 606 STIPULATION of Dismissal by RODERICK RICHARDSON. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 27, 2016 Filing 605 STIPULATION of Dismissal by TONYA PIERCE. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 27, 2016 Filing 604 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JAMES MIMS. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 27, 2016 Filing 603 STIPULATION of Dismissal by MARCIA JAMES. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 27, 2016 Filing 602 STIPULATION of Dismissal by TONYA IVERSON. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 27, 2016 Filing 601 STIPULATION of Dismissal by SHIRLEY HOLCOMBE. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 27, 2016 Filing 600 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ANNETTE GREEN. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 27, 2016 Filing 599 STIPULATION of Dismissal by MARY FLOWERS. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 27, 2016 Filing 598 STIPULATION of Dismissal by GLENN CASSELL. (NIGH, DANIEL)
April 26, 2016 Filing 597 Letter from Susan M. Sharko regarding interpreters. (CARROLL, DANIEL)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER that this Court's #9 Order to Show Cause is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/26/2016. (TH, )
April 26, 2016 Filing 595 LETTER, addressed to Counsel, Re: Overdue PFS. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/26/16. (js)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER, Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. CARMEN CUNNINGHAM (15-5006) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/26/16. (js)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER, Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; FRANK BALTIMORE (15-5245) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/26/16. (js)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/26/2016. (TH, )
April 26, 2016 Filing 591 Letter from Adam Slater regarding issues surrounding Daiichi depositions in Hawaii. (SLATER, ADAM)
April 25, 2016 Filing 590 Letter from Susan M. Sharko regarding schedule for Daiichi Sankyo Co, Ltd. depositions in Hawaii. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 25, 2016 Filing 589 Letter from Christopher L. Coffin. (COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
April 22, 2016 Filing 588 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7059933) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Elizabeth Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SNAPKA, KATHRYN) Modified on 4/25/2016 (dd).16-2281RBK/JS
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67),etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67) etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (dmr)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2016. (TH, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/16. (js)
April 22, 2016 Filing 513 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney KIMBERLY APONTE BORDEN terminated. (APONTE BORDEN, KIMBERLY)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (dmr)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (dmr)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/21/2016. (dmr)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (dmr)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (dmr)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (dmr)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/21/2016. (dmr)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (dmr)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Pltf show cause at the status conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler, why Pltf's Complaint and all claims against the Defts should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (dmr)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/21/16. (js)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/21/16. (js)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/21/16. (js)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/21/16. (js)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/21/16. (js)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/21/2016. (TH, )
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/21/2016. (TH, )
April 21, 2016 Filing 505 Letter from Susan Sharko regarding the Sandra Madden case (15-cv-3679) re #465 Letter. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/16. (js)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/16. (js)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (TH, )
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/16. (js)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/16. (js)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/16. (js)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (TH, )
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/16. (js)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/16. (js)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (TH, )
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (TH, )
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (TH, )
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 152606, Doc. No. 67), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/16. (js)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (TH, )
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (TH, )
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the Status Conference on 5/26/2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS per this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). ORDERED that failure to respond will result in dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (TH, )
April 21, 2016 Filing 487 STIPULATION of Dismissal by VICTORIA HAMLIN. (SNOWDON, PETER)
April 21, 2016 Filing 486 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID JACOBY on behalf of ALEXIS KOZAK (JACOBY, DAVID)
April 21, 2016 Setting Deadlines as to #485 MOTION to Vacate #383 Order, Add and Terminate Parties MOTION to Reopen Case , #484 MOTION to Vacate #381 Order, Add and Terminate Parties MOTION to Reopen Case . Motions set for 5/16/2016 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 488 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 25. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/16. (js)
April 20, 2016 Filing 485 MOTION to Vacate #383 Order, Add and Terminate Parties , MOTION to Reopen Case by DEE ANN POHNERT. (MATTHEWS, DAVID)
April 20, 2016 Filing 484 MOTION to Vacate #381 Order, Add and Terminate Parties , MOTION to Reopen Case by SUMMER KRISTEN FORD. (MATTHEWS, DAVID)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. #67 ), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/16. (js)
April 20, 2016 Filing 482 Letter from Daniel B. Carroll regarding deposition transcript of Tina Ho. (CARROLL, DANIEL)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 481 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 24. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/20/16. (js)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk shall close the case (15-4410). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (TH, )
April 20, 2016 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/26/2016 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler. (bf, )
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER, Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. PATTIE F. DAVIS (15-3776) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/16. (js)
April 20, 2016 Filing 478 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler: Status Conference held on 4/18/2016. (Court Reporter Carl Nami, Jr.) (bf, ) Modified on 5/20/2016 (dd).
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER, A discovery conference call will be held on Thursday, April 28, 2016 at 12:00 P.M. with Magistrate Judge Schneider, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/20/16. (js)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk shall close the case (15-4110). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (TH, )
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk shall close the case (15-5889). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (TH, )
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER dismissing with prejudice Civ. No. 15-4443. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/20/2016. (tf, )
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER denying #314 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/19/16. (js)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER, that Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Seal is GRANTED. The Clerk shall seal the Certification of Adam M. Slater (Civ. No. 15-3905, Doc. No. #12 ). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/19/16. (js)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER denying #259 Motion to Dismiss ; granting #260 Motion to Seal; denying w/o prejudice #262 Motion to Withdraw ; granting #263 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/19/16. (js)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER denying #297 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/19/16. (js)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER, Defendants' Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motions to Seal are GRANTED. The Clerk shall seal the Exhibit to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions (Civ. No. 15-4796, Doc. No. #10 ) and Plaintiff's Letter Brief in Opposition to the Motion for Sanctions, the Certification of Behram V. Parekh, Esq., and Exhibit A thereto (Civ. No. 15-4796, Doc. No. #12 ). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/19/16. (js)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER denying #313 Motion to Dismiss; IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/19/16. (js)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER denying #296 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/19/16. (js)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER denying #237 Motion Dismiss Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/19/16. (js)
April 19, 2016 Filing 465 Letter from Susan S. Sharko regarding cases listed on April 18, 2016 Conference Joint Agenda. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 19, 2016 Filing 464 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hannah Houck. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER denying without prejudice #386 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/19/2016. (tf, )
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER denying #264 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/19/2016. (tf, )
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER denying without prejudice #254 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting #255 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/19/2016. (tf, )
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's (Civ. No. 15-6509, Doc. No. 7) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/19/2016. (TH, )
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 459 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/19/16. (js)
April 18, 2016 Filing 458 Letter from Susan M. Sharko regarding revised medical records protocol. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 15, 2016 Filing 457 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Agenda by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 12, 2016 Filing 456 STIPULATION of Dismissal by MARK RIVERS. (SNOWDON, PETER)
April 11, 2016 Filing 455 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #414 MOTION for Additional Defense Strikes of Bellwether Trial Candidates (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 8, 2016 Filing 454 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/8/2016. (Court Reporter: E.C.R.) (js)
April 7, 2016 Filing 453 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Joint Agenda by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 7, 2016 Filing 452 Letter from Christopher Coffin regarding objections to Defendants proposed interpreters. (COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)
April 6, 2016 Filing 451 Letter from Susan M. Sharko regarding objections to one of plaintiffs proposed interpreters. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
April 6, 2016 Filing 450 Letter from Adam Slater (Medical Records Protocol). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SLATER, ADAM)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' #392 Motion to Preclude Woodshedding, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/6/2016. (TH, ) Modified on 4/7/2016 (TH).
April 6, 2016 Filing 448 STIPULATION of Dismissal by SALINDA MOORE. (ALMEIDA, JESSICA)
April 5, 2016 Filing 447 STIPULATION of Dismissal by JONATHON MILLER. (SNOWDON, PETER)
April 1, 2016 Filing 446 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by JEFFREY HARPER, MICHELLE HARPER. (SLATER, ADAM)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 445 MDL TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED the parties shall meet and confer in person or by phone and identify by no later than April 6, 2016, whether there are any disputes regarding defendants' March 31, 2016 letter [Doc. No. 444] addressing the Medical Records Protocol. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 41/1/6\. (Schneider, Joel)
March 31, 2016 Filing 444 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq. enclosing Medical Records Protocol. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Medical Records Protocol)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 31, 2016 Filing 443 Letter from Adam Slater (Regarding Dismissal of Jeffrey Harper, 15-4001). (SLATER, ADAM)
March 31, 2016 Filing 442 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CHARLES M. HALL. (SNOWDON, PETER)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 441 LETTER ORDER granting the #439 Letter request to extend the deadline for objections to 4/6/2016, to conduct interviews in an effort to determine whether an objection is needed re: proposed interpreters to be retained for use at depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/29/2016. (TH, )
March 30, 2016 Filing 440 Letter from Susan M. Sharko regarding dismissal of bellwether pool cases. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 29, 2016 Filing 439 Letter from M. Zogby. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
March 28, 2016 Filing 438 STIPULATION of Dismissal by RUBENA MORRIS. (PITTNER, LAURA)
March 28, 2016 Filing 437 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #392 MOTION to Preclude 'Woodshedding' (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 24, 2016 Filing 436 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/21/2016, before Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER and Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Farrell (856-318-6100). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 4/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2016. (tf, )
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER RE: PERFORMANCE EVALUATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/24/16. (js)
March 24, 2016 Filing 434 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by DANNY JOHNSON. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
March 24, 2016 Filing 433 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by LORI ANN HOOVER, MICHAEL HOOVER. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
March 24, 2016 Filing 432 COMPLAINT against DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7000786) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jodi Peters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCEWEN, GREGORY) Modified on 3/24/2016 (dd).16-1650RBK/JS
March 24, 2016 Filing 431 Letter from Adam Slater (Subpoena to Manini Patel). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena directed to Manini Patel)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER, paragraph 3 of the March 22, 2016 Order [Doc. No. #428 ] is amended to reflect that the next general status meeting will be held before the Honorable Robert B. Kugler on April 18, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/23/16. (js)
March 23, 2016 Filing 429 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Manini Patel). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER, The April 6 and April 27, 2016 conferences are POSTPONED. A discovery conference call will be held on April 8, 2016 at 2:30 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Schneider, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/22/16. (js)
March 22, 2016 Filing 427 Letter addressed to Counsel, Re: Pending Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/22/16. (js)
March 21, 2016 Filing 426 Letter from Adam Slater in opposition to defendants motion for additional bellwether strikes. (SLATER, ADAM)
March 21, 2016 Filing 425 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler & Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/21/2016. Ordered Telephone Conference scheduled for April 8, 2016 at 2:30 p.m. Ordered In-Person Status Conference scheduled for April 18, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Kugler and Discovery Conference scheduled at 12:00 p.m. with Judge Schneider.(April 6th and 27th hearings cancelled). Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Carol Farrell) (js)
March 21, 2016 Filing 424 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #386 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Windell Avery (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 21, 2016 Filing 422 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JANICE AASEN re #392 MOTION to Preclude 'Woodshedding' (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(RESNICK, STEVEN)
March 20, 2016 Filing 421 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CINDY SUE LEGGETT. (SLATER, ADAM)
March 18, 2016 Filing 420 Letter from Susan M. Sharko. (Attachments: #1 Letter from M. Zogby to A. Slater)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER RE: MEDICAL RECORDS PROTOCOL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/18/2016. (tf, )
March 18, 2016 Filing 418 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Joint Agenda by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 17, 2016 Filing 417 Letter from Adam Slater regarding dismissal of Leggett case. (SLATER, ADAM)
March 16, 2016 Filing 416 Letter from Susan M. Sharko re #392 MOTION to Preclude 'Woodshedding' . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Xarelto Order)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 16, 2016 Filing 415 Letter from Daniel B. Carroll to Adam Slater regarding Deposition Transcripts. (CARROLL, DANIEL)
March 15, 2016 Setting Deadlines as to #414 MOTION for Additional Defense Strikes of Bellwether Trial Candidates . Motion set for 4/18/2016 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
March 15, 2016 Filing 414 MOTION for Additional Defense Strikes of Bellwether Trial Candidates by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Letter Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 15, 2016 Filing 413 STIPULATION of Dismissal by VELMA SMITH-MAYS. (SNOWDON, PETER)
March 15, 2016 Filing 412 STIPULATION of Dismissal by RICHARD JOHNSON. (PITTNER, LAURA)
March 15, 2016 Filing 411 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ARTHUR ANDREWS. (PITTNER, LAURA)
March 14, 2016 Filing 410 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Kathleen Chavanu). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Kathleen Chavanu)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 14, 2016 Filing 409 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of John Raia). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of John Raia)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 14, 2016 Filing 408 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of James Molt). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of James Molt)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 14, 2016 Filing 407 Letter from Adam M. Slater to Susan Sharko regarding the deposition transcript of Anthony Corrado. (SLATER, ADAM)
March 11, 2016 Filing 406 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Glenn Gormley). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Glenn Gormley)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 11, 2016 Filing 405 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of William Bailey). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of William Bailey)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 11, 2016 Filing 404 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Allen Feldman). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Allen Feldman)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 11, 2016 Filing 403 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Antonia Wang). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Antonia Wang)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 11, 2016 Filing 402 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Crawford Parker). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Crawford Parker)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 11, 2016 Filing 401 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Alan Bergstrom). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Alan Bergstrom)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 11, 2016 Filing 400 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Herve Caspard). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Herve Caspard)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 11, 2016 Filing 399 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/3/16, before Judge Schneider. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Farrell (856-318-6100). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 4/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2016. (dd, )
March 10, 2016 Filing 398 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Oliseyenum Nwose). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Oliseyenum Nwose)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 10, 2016 Filing 397 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Jonathan Jaffe). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Jonathan Jaffe)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 9, 2016 Filing 396 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Jay Feingold). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition of Jay Feingold)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 9, 2016 Filing 395 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Michael Melino). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Michael Melino)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 9, 2016 Filing 394 Letter from Adam M. Slater (Deposition Notice of Tina Ho). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Notice of Tina Ho)(SLATER, ADAM)
March 9, 2016 Setting Deadlines as to #392 MOTION to Preclude 'Woodshedding' . Motion set for 4/4/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
March 9, 2016 Filing 393 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. re #392 MOTION to Preclude 'Woodshedding' (SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 9, 2016 Filing 392 MOTION to Preclude 'Woodshedding' by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS,INC., DAIICHI SANYKO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Certification of Daryl Daly, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Certificate of Service)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 8, 2016 Filing 391 Letter from Adam Slater (Deposition Notice of Diane Benezra-Kurshan). (SLATER, ADAM)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 390 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 22, Deposition Guidelines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/8/16. (js)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER Dismissing as moot #256 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney AND #257 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/16. (js)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER, Good cause having been shown, defendants' deadline for the production of the requested ROADMAP documents is extended from March 19, 2016 to April 15, 2016. Defendants' rolling production shall start on March 15, 2016, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/7/16. (js)
March 7, 2016 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Document #387 Motion, filed on 3/7/16 by JOSEPH T. WAECHTER, was filed in this matter in error. Please disregard. (js)
March 7, 2016 Setting Deadlines as to #386 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 4/4/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
March 7, 2016 Filing 388 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq. regarding proposed deposition protocol. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Deposition Protocol)(SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 7, 2016 Filing 387 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Short Form Complaint by MILDRED DAVIS. (WAECHTER, JOSEPH)
March 7, 2016 Filing 386 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by WINDELL AVERY. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice, GILBERT YOUNG (15-5041) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/16. (js)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice, MICHAEL DOUGLAS SHIELDS (15-5386) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/16. (js)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice, DEE ANN POHNERT (15-5376) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/16. (js)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER that Plaintiff Johnathan Jay Roth's (15cv5379) Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/2016. (TH, )
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice; SUMMER KRISTEN FORD (15-5365) terminated. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/16. (js)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff's case appeared on the chart of overdue PFS in the Proposed Joint Agenda and Report for the January 27, 2016 Status Conference (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 252); IT FURTHER APPEARING TO THE COURT that Plaintiff's case appeared on the chart of overdue PFS in the Proposed Joint Agenda and Report for the March 3, 2016 Status Conference (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 358); IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Wednesday, April 6, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/16. (js)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER that Plaintiff Michael Foster's (15cv4292) Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/2016. (TH, ) Modified on 3/7/2016 (TH).
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 378 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 21. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/16. (js)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER that Plaintiff Sonya A. Patterson's (15cv4829) Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/2016. (TH, )
March 7, 2016 Filing 376 Letter from Susan M. Sharko, Esq. regarding medical records collection. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
March 7, 2016 Filing 374 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference re: deposition issue held on 3/7/2016. (Court Reporter: E.C.R.) (js)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Wednesday, April 6, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 15-2606, Doc. No. 67). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/16. (js)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the status conference on Wednesday, April 6, 2016 at 2:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4D of the Mitchell H. Cohen United States Courthouse, 1 John F. Gerry Plaza, Camden, N.J. 08101, why Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to file a PFS in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 7 (Civ. No. 152606, Doc. No. 67). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/16. (js)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff for a status conference on 4/6/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/2016. (TH, )
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff for a status conference on 4/6/2016 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/7/2016. (TH, )
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order