Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc. v. Payne et al
Plaintiff: Ruane Cuniff & Goldfarb, Inc. and Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.
Defendant: Percy Payne, Brenda Keeton, Kathleen Moerschel, Brian Majernik, Robert Berkstresser, David Eisenberger, Melanie Dillon, James Ducharme, John Harper, Chelle Adkins, Roy Allen, Mary Triggs, Harold Wenninghoff, Donna Caswell, Dan Woods, Mary Lamy, Bruce Goins, Sara Easterbrook, Kevin Barclay, Elizabeth Vannaman, Leann Garvey, Steven Walker, David Lovetere, Andrich Parker, Stacey Elliott, Dana Terry, Amy Stottlemyre, Stefan Kolev, Jennifer House, Michael Gillespie, Kimberly Bolch, Timothy Lane, Alicia Costanzo, Mary Espinoza, Brad McMillin, Loren Province, Waiyee Tsang, Brent Wineland, Louis Connell, William Edwards, Steven Inman, Sandra Peoples, Heath Mustain, Chad Lanning, Marci Bien-Aime, Donna Tuescher, Paul Coe, Maria Alvarado, Mary Cross, Jennifer Larson, Dorothy Coffie, Anthony Shank, Susan Jones, Daniel Meyer, Mary Wiese, Bernard Billesbach, James Elliott, Troy Stiff, Edward Robinson, James Ship, John McConnell, Charles Schell, Sarah Welch, Kevin Bostick, Alice Wright, Dennis Dunbar, Larry Squiers, Jo Inzenga, Amy Mcvay, Cynthia Lair, Karen Owens, Dustain Shaw, Francis Jones, Juree Barkley, Royce Closterman, Joan Horan, Michael Brummel, John Graves, Richard Fortune, Patrick Nichols, Caryl Summers, Elizabeth Johanson, Kristine Johnson, Craig Schuerman, Michael Sellers, Steven Harbert, Matt Crosson, Melissa Ferguson, Phillip Biggs, Michael Brandt, Kenneth Hager, Jonathan Hinchee, Scott Alexander, Camille Jackson, Linda Terry, Daniel Cranmer, Leslie Wiggins, Jason Hamilton, Dennis Simmons, Amanda Hyland, Gary Blanck, Greg Parrish, Michael Moffitt, Michael Giro, Kimberly Witt, Nakima Cutchlow, Kole Scarbrough, Greg Brokaw, Michael Lovell, David Operach, Sarah Murphy, Darren Kinney, Dennis Sessler, Stacey Goins, William Brennecke, Casey Holloway, Ingrid McNicholas, Lori Vander Waerdt, Tracey Alden, Anne Beaulieu, John Oswald, Jeffrey Harris, Jamie Clark, Marcella Stoneking, Melody Miser, Cassaundra McKown, Tom Buechel, Kristy Hill, Kathleen McBride, Stephen Bay, Patrick Cook, Nikki Powell, Cynthia Stunkel, Ruth Hughes, Della Graybeal, Barry Krevitz, Harry Crocker, Davinia Santimano, Melissa Simpkins, Timothy Lyons, Lisa Cracraft, Vanessa Bross, Tamarie Williams, William Hottel, Amy Keller, Thomas Edlund, Deborah Treat, Benjamin Redwing, Christopher Ithurburn, Diane Brown, Thomas McDonnell, Janet Kannard, Anne Arnold, Travis Schulte, Robert Conklin, Joshua Rhodes, Mark Salyer, Donald Belinger, Jennifer Eli, Kendra Burmaster, Lisa Alexander, Cynthia Stordahl, Carrie Crowder, Meri Mason, Keely Grayson-Inman, Robert Tritt, Beverly Wessar, Roger Poynter, Mitchell Van Kam, Wanda Tyner, Leslie Riley, Patrick Williams, Deborah Quast, Alicia Andrews, Shalaine Bowen, Lisa Kudrick, William Hancock, Matthew Axton, Patricia Mergen, Jennifer McCord, Ronald Reynolds, Julie Cansler, Theresa Hursh, James Laramy, WIlliam Johnson, Debra Payne, Brian Slattery, Julie McGivern, Brian White, Mark McLaughlin, Craig Hewitt, David Walter, Brent Mayberry, William Clower, Thomas McCullough, Debra Kallenberger, Lynn Sarowski, Chris Valverde, Thomas Coulter, Gregg Bedell, Robert Redwing, Lawr Schellenberger, Thomas Kane, Scott Slocum, Gary Lamy, Phillip Klassen, Kristin Smithmier, Kelly Highfill, Sally Schlintz, Reba Jackson, John Shultz, Matthew Dunn, Nicholas Rutkowski, Michelle O'Brien, Andrea Medina, Diane Salinas, Denise Rojas, Patrick Lawless, Christopher Carter, Breanne Redwing, Melanie Moentmann, Kathleen Sarette, Rodney Kane, Dianne Behney, Jodee Horseman, Torri Van Kam, Richard Tuescher, Christopher Davis, Alan Burgers, Juan De Los Santos, Alicia Beckman, Kevin Moll, Rebecca Clyma, Dianna Hoover, Wayne Brookshire, Mark Ballew, Katherine Gillespie, Carl Damron, Joseph Kenney, Jason Sutton, Jill McManus-Netwal, Douglas Stalcup, Amy Francois, Derron Rolf, Anthony Medina, Rita Hartley, Peggy Leineke, Shelly Schuerman, Michael Oltmanns, Deanna Schulz, Don Kleoppel, Ashley Reik, Barbara Ham, Karla Floyd, Russell Brooks, Steven Sturgeon, Leanne Trimble, Alison Magathan, Angie Manske, Erin Kendall, John Does 1-100, Robert Hyberger, Margaret Broderick, Jacqueline Davis, Martha Sabin, Robert Tillotson, Stephanie McMillin, Carolyn Stegeman, Shelley McMullin, Kevin Garrett, Robert Parrott, Stephanie Stevens, Nancy Rellihan, Robert Hutter, Eric Pearce, Christopher Bonjour, Jackie Older-Hefner, Russell Revis, Kiva Miller, Jennifer Overholtzer, Fred Quatrocky, Sara Fogt, Ryan Magathan, Melissa Meyer, Patricia Pottinger, William Turnage, Joseph Filardo, Yvette Santimano, Cindy Gordanier, Janet Gamble-Duff, Jeff Carroll, Karen Mustain, Betsy McCollum, Donald Woehrman, James Bates, James Robinson, Brian Kemp, Michael Murphy, Donna Barbour, Michael Spellman, Kenneth Stwalley, Scott Yungeberg, Barney Frazier, Deborah Welhoff, Eric Garst, Jacqueline Jensen, Billie Geer, Randy Cook, Robert Lavalley, Stacey Bell, Jennifer Bischoff, Tina Carey, Randall Sharp and Brent Larson
Nominal Defendant: Deborah A. Smith, DST Systems, Inc., Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Robert Canfield, Latrecia Onunkwor, Bonnie Kartz, Michael L. Ferguson, David Ostermeyer, Jill Pehlman, Mark Mendon, United States Secretary of Labor, Diana Weaver, Eugene Scalia and Secretary of Labor Eugene Scalia
Case Number: 1:2019cv11297
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OF LAW Addressing The Representation Of Defendants By Counsel Who Have Been Disqualified In Canfield and Mendon. Document filed by Percy Payne..(Schermerhorn, Andrew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OF LAW regarding Plaintiff Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb Inc.'s Memorandum Of Law Addressing The Representation Of Defendants In Payne By Counsel Who Have Been Disqualified In Canfield and Mendon. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc...(Ward, Robert)
July 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #69 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
July 10, 2020 Filing 69 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. Related Document Number: [Docket # 68]..(Ward, Robert) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 10, 2020 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #67 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc...(Ward, Robert)
July 10, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc...(Ward, Robert)
July 6, 2020 Filing 66 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Robert J. Ward dated July 6, 2020 Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc...(Ward, Robert)
March 27, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Gregory F. Jacob. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc...(Fedder, Natasha)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #63 Motion for Kolin C. Tang to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/13/2020) (rj)
March 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #63 MOTION for Kolin C. Tang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19080622. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
March 11, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Kolin C. Tang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19080622. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael L. Ferguson, Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Deborah A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Tang, Kolin)
March 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #62 MOTION for MONIQUE OLIVIER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19070034. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT STATE OF CALIFORNIA;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
March 10, 2020 Filing 62 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for MONIQUE OLIVIER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19070034. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael L. Ferguson, Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Deborah A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M. Olivier's Declaration In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit M. Olivier's California Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit M. Olivier's Massachusetts Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Olivier, Monique) Modified on 3/11/2020 (vba).
February 27, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #61 MOTION for Ronald S. Kravitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18941473. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF TEXAS. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
February 27, 2020 Filing 61 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Ronald S. Kravitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18941473. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael L. Ferguson, Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Deborah A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ronald S. Kravitz, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Kravitz, Ronald) Modified on 2/27/2020 (aea).
February 21, 2020 Filing 60 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Robert J. Ward of Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP dated February 21, 2020 re: response to the February 18, 2020 letter from Anna Area requesting a pre-motion conference. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc...(Ward, Robert)
February 20, 2020 Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Lewis R. Clayton dated February 20, 2020 re: Letter Response to Docket No. 54. Document filed by DST Systems, Inc...(Clayton, Lewis)
February 20, 2020 Filing 58 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Robert J. Ward dated February 20, 2020 re: Response to Claimants' February 13, 2020 Letter. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc...(Ward, Robert)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #55 Motion for Nathan Zipperian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/19/2020) (rjm)
February 18, 2020 Filing 56 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Anticipated Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Anna O. Area dated 02/18/2020. Document filed by Eugene Scalia..(Mariscal, Isidro)
February 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #55 MOTION for Nathan Zipperian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18804682. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
February 14, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Nathan Zipperian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18804682. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael L. Ferguson, Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Deborah A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificates of Good Standing).(Zipperian, Nathan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Andrew Schermerhorn dated February 13, 2020 re: Supplemental Authority in Support of Claimants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Chelle Adkins, Tracey Alden, Lisa Alexander, Scott Alexander, Roy Allen, Maria Alvarado, Alicia Andrews, Anne Arnold, Matthew Axton, Mark Ballew, Donna Barbour, Kevin Barclay, Juree Barkley, James Bates, Stephen Bay, Anne Beaulieu, Alicia Beckman, Gregg Bedell, Dianne Behney, Donald Belinger, Stacey Bell, Robert Berkstresser, Marci Bien-Aime, Phillip Biggs, Bernard Billesbach, Jennifer Bischoff, Gary Blanck, Kimberly Bolch, Christopher Bonjour, Kevin Bostick, Shalaine Bowen, Michael Brandt, William Brennecke, Margaret Broderick, Greg Brokaw, Russell Brooks, Wayne Brookshire, Vanessa Bross, Diane Brown, Michael Brummel, Tom Buechel, Alan Burgers, Kendra Burmaster, Robert Canfield, Julie Cansler, Tina Carey, Jeff Carroll, Christopher Carter, Donna Caswell, Jamie Clark, Royce Closterman, William Clower, Rebecca Clyma, Paul Coe, Dorothy Coffie, Robert Conklin, Louis Connell, Patrick Cook, Randy Cook, Alicia Costanzo, Thomas Coulter, Lisa Cracraft, Daniel Cranmer, Harry Crocker, Mary Cross, Matt Crosson, Carrie Crowder, Nakima Cutchlow, Carl Damron, Christopher Davis, Jacqueline Davis, Juan De Los Santos, Melanie Dillon, James Ducharme, Dennis Dunbar, Matthew Dunn, Sara Easterbrook, Thomas Edlund, William Edwards, David Eisenberger, Jennifer Eli, James Elliott, Stacey Elliott, Mary Espinoza, Melissa Ferguson, Joseph Filardo, Karla Floyd, Sara Fogt, Richard Fortune, Amy Francois, Barney Frazier, Janet Gamble-Duff, Kevin Garrett, Eric Garst, Leann Garvey, Billie Geer, Katherine Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Michael Giro, Bruce Goins, Stacey Goins, Cindy Gordanier, John Graves, Della Graybeal, Keely Grayson-Inman, Kenneth Hager, Barbara Ham, Jason Hamilton, William Hancock, Steven Harbert, John Harper, Jeffrey Harris, Rita Hartley, Craig Hewitt, Kelly Highfill, Kristy Hill, Jonathan Hinchee, Casey Holloway, Dianna Hoover, Joan Horan, Jodee Horseman, William Hottel, Jennifer House, Ruth Hughes, Theresa Hursh, Robert Hutter, Robert Hyberger, Amanda Hyland, Steven Inman, Jo Inzenga, Christopher Ithurburn, Camille Jackson, Reba Jackson, Jacqueline Jensen, Elizabeth Johanson, John Does 1-100, Kristine Johnson, WIlliam Johnson, Francis Jones, Susan Jones, Debra Kallenberger, Rodney Kane, Thomas Kane, Janet Kannard, Bonnie Kartz, Brenda Keeton, Amy Keller, Brian Kemp, Erin Kendall, Joseph Kenney, Darren Kinney, Phillip Klassen, Don Kleoppel, Stefan Kolev, Barry Krevitz, Lisa Kudrick, Cynthia Lair, Gary Lamy, Mary Lamy, Timothy Lane, Chad Lanning, James Laramy, Brent Larson, Jennifer Larson, Robert Lavalley, Patrick Lawless, Peggy Leineke, Michael Lovell, David Lovetere, Timothy Lyons, Alison Magathan, Ryan Magathan, Brian Majernik, Angie Manske, Meri Mason, Brent Mayberry, Kathleen McBride, Betsy McCollum, John McConnell, Jennifer McCord, Thomas McCullough, Thomas McDonnell, Julie McGivern, Cassaundra McKown, Mark McLaughlin, Jill McManus-Netwal, Brad McMillin, Stephanie McMillin, Shelley McMullin, Ingrid McNicholas, Amy Mcvay, Andrea Medina, Anthony Medina, Mark Mendon, Patricia Mergen, Daniel Meyer, Melissa Meyer, Kiva Miller, Melody Miser, Melanie Moentmann, Kathleen Moerschel, Michael Moffitt, Kevin Moll, Michael Murphy, Sarah Murphy, Heath Mustain, Karen Mustain, Patrick Nichols, Michelle O'Brien, Jackie Older-Hefner, Michael Oltmanns, Latrecia Onunkwor, David Operach, David Ostermeyer, John Oswald, Jennifer Overholtzer, Karen Owens, Andrich Parker, Greg Parrish, Robert Parrott, Debra Payne, Percy Payne, Eric Pearce, Jill Pehlman, Sandra Peoples, Patricia Pottinger, Nikki Powell, Roger Poynter, Loren Province, Deborah Quast, Fred Quatrocky, Benjamin Redwing, Breanne Redwing, Robert Redwing, Ashley Reik, Nancy Rellihan, Russell Revis, Ronald Reynolds, Joshua Rhodes, Leslie Riley, Edward Robinson, James Robinson, Denise Rojas, Derron Rolf, Nicholas Rutkowski, Martha Sabin, Diane Salinas, Mark Salyer, Davinia Santimano, Yvette Santimano, Kathleen Sarette, Lynn Sarowski, Eugene Scalia, Kole Scarbrough, Charles Schell, Lawr Schellenberger, Sally Schlintz, Craig Schuerman, Shelly Schuerman, Travis Schulte, Deanna Schulz, Michael Sellers, Dennis Sessler, Anthony Shank, Randall Sharp, Dustain Shaw, James Ship, John Shultz, Dennis Simmons, Melissa Simpkins, Brian Slattery, Scott Slocum, Kristin Smithmier, Michael Spellman, Larry Squiers, Douglas Stalcup, Carolyn Stegeman, Stephanie Stevens, Troy Stiff, Marcella Stoneking, Cynthia Stordahl, Amy Stottlemyre, Cynthia Stunkel, Steven Sturgeon, Kenneth Stwalley, Caryl Summers, Jason Sutton, Dana Terry, Linda Terry, Robert Tillotson, Deborah Treat, Mary Triggs, Leanne Trimble, Robert Tritt, Waiyee Tsang, Donna Tuescher, Richard Tuescher, William Turnage, Wanda Tyner, Chris Valverde, Mitchell Van Kam, Torri Van Kam, Elizabeth Vannaman, Lori Vander Waerdt, Steven Walker, David Walter, Diana Weaver, Sarah Welch, Deborah Welhoff, Harold Wenninghoff, Beverly Wessar, Brian White, Mary Wiese, Leslie Wiggins, Patrick Williams, Tamarie Williams, Brent Wineland, Kimberly Witt, Donald Woehrman, Dan Woods, Alice Wright, Scott Yungeberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Schermerhorn, Andrew)
February 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #53 MOTION for James E. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18793170. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 13, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for James E. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18793170. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael L. Ferguson, Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Deborah A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificates of Good Standing).(Miller, James)
February 7, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc...(Ward, Robert)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #48 Motion for Natasha S. Fedder to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/5/2020) (rj)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #47 Motion for Gregory F. Jacob to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/5/2020) (rj)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #44 Motion for Alec J. Berin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/5/2020) (rj)
February 5, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #48 MOTION for Natasha S. Fedder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18700490. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
February 5, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Natasha S. Fedder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18700490. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Natasha S. Fedder, #2 CA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 (Proposed) Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Fedder, Natasha)
February 5, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #47 MOTION for Gregory F. Jacob to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18699992. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 5, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Gregory F. Jacob to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18699992. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory F. Jacob, #2 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 (Proposed) Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Jacob, Gregory)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. SO ORDERED. Replies due by 2/7/2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/31/2020) (cf)
January 30, 2020 Filing 45 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Frank Olander dated January 30, 2020. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc..(Olander, Frank)
January 29, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #44 MOTION for Alec J. Berin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18627138. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 29, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Alec J. Berin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18627138. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael L. Ferguson, Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Deborah A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berin, Alec)
January 27, 2020 Filing 43 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Chelle Adkins, Tracey Alden, Lisa Alexander, Scott Alexander, Roy Allen, Maria Alvarado, Alicia Andrews, Anne Arnold, Matthew Axton, Mark Ballew, Donna Barbour, Kevin Barclay, Juree Barkley, James Bates, Stephen Bay, Anne Beaulieu, Alicia Beckman, Gregg Bedell, Dianne Behney, Donald Belinger, Stacey Bell, Robert Berkstresser, Marci Bien-Aime, Phillip Biggs, Bernard Billesbach, Jennifer Bischoff, Gary Blanck, Kimberly Bolch, Christopher Bonjour, Kevin Bostick, Shalaine Bowen, Michael Brandt, William Brennecke, Margaret Broderick, Greg Brokaw, Russell Brooks, Wayne Brookshire, Vanessa Bross, Diane Brown, Michael Brummel, Tom Buechel, Alan Burgers, Kendra Burmaster, Julie Cansler, Tina Carey, Jeff Carroll, Christopher Carter, Donna Caswell, Jamie Clark, Royce Closterman, William Clower, Rebecca Clyma, Paul Coe, Dorothy Coffie, Robert Conklin, Louis Connell, Patrick Cook, Randy Cook, Alicia Costanzo, Thomas Coulter, Lisa Cracraft, Daniel Cranmer, Harry Crocker, Mary Cross, Matt Crosson, Carrie Crowder, Nakima Cutchlow, Carl Damron, Christopher Davis, Jacqueline Davis, Juan De Los Santos, Melanie Dillon, James Ducharme, Dennis Dunbar, Matthew Dunn, Sara Easterbrook, Thomas Edlund, William Edwards, David Eisenberger, Jennifer Eli, James Elliott, Stacey Elliott, Mary Espinoza, Melissa Ferguson, Joseph Filardo, Karla Floyd, Sara Fogt, Richard Fortune, Amy Francois, Barney Frazier, Janet Gamble-Duff, Kevin Garrett, Eric Garst, Leann Garvey, Billie Geer, Katherine Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Michael Giro, Bruce Goins, Stacey Goins, Cindy Gordanier, John Graves, Della Graybeal, Keely Grayson-Inman, Kenneth Hager, Barbara Ham, Jason Hamilton, William Hancock, Steven Harbert, John Harper, Jeffrey Harris, Rita Hartley, Craig Hewitt, Kelly Highfill, Kristy Hill, Jonathan Hinchee, Casey Holloway, Dianna Hoover, Joan Horan, Jodee Horseman, William Hottel, Jennifer House, Ruth Hughes, Theresa Hursh, Robert Hutter, Robert Hyberger, Amanda Hyland, Steven Inman, Jo Inzenga, Christopher Ithurburn, Camille Jackson, Reba Jackson, Jacqueline Jensen, Elizabeth Johanson, John Does 1-100, Kristine Johnson, WIlliam Johnson, Francis Jones, Susan Jones, Debra Kallenberger, Rodney Kane, Thomas Kane, Janet Kannard, Brenda Keeton, Amy Keller, Brian Kemp, Erin Kendall, Joseph Kenney, Darren Kinney, Phillip Klassen, Don Kleoppel, Stefan Kolev, Barry Krevitz, Lisa Kudrick, Cynthia Lair, Gary Lamy, Mary Lamy, Timothy Lane, Chad Lanning, James Laramy, Brent Larson, Jennifer Larson, Robert Lavalley, Patrick Lawless, Peggy Leineke, Michael Lovell, David Lovetere, Timothy Lyons, Alison Magathan, Ryan Magathan, Brian Majernik, Angie Manske, Meri Mason, Brent Mayberry, Kathleen McBride, Betsy McCollum, John McConnell, Jennifer McCord, Thomas McCullough, Thomas McDonnell, Julie McGivern, Cassaundra McKown, Mark McLaughlin, Jill McManus-Netwal, Brad McMillin, Stephanie McMillin, Shelley McMullin, Ingrid McNicholas, Amy Mcvay, Andrea Medina, Anthony Medina, Patricia Mergen, Daniel Meyer, Melissa Meyer, Kiva Miller, Melody Miser, Melanie Moentmann, Kathleen Moerschel, Michael Moffitt, Kevin Moll, Michael Murphy, Sarah Murphy, Heath Mustain, Karen Mustain, Patrick Nichols, Michelle O'Brien, Jackie Older-Hefner, Michael Oltmanns, David Operach, John Oswald, Jennifer Overholtzer, Karen Owens, Andrich Parker, Greg Parrish, Robert Parrott, Debra Payne, Percy Payne, Eric Pearce, Sandra Peoples, Patricia Pottinger, Nikki Powell, Roger Poynter, Loren Province, Deborah Quast, Fred Quatrocky, Benjamin Redwing, Breanne Redwing, Robert Redwing, Ashley Reik, Nancy Rellihan, Russell Revis, Ronald Reynolds, Joshua Rhodes, Leslie Riley, Edward Robinson, James Robinson, Denise Rojas, Derron Rolf, Nicholas Rutkowski, Martha Sabin, Diane Salinas, Mark Salyer, Davinia Santimano, Yvette Santimano, Kathleen Sarette, Lynn Sarowski, Kole Scarbrough, Charles Schell, Lawr Schellenberger, Sally Schlintz, Craig Schuerman, Shelly Schuerman, Travis Schulte, Deanna Schulz, Michael Sellers, Dennis Sessler, Anthony Shank, Randall Sharp, Dustain Shaw, James Ship, John Shultz, Dennis Simmons, Melissa Simpkins, Brian Slattery, Scott Slocum, Kristin Smithmier, Michael Spellman, Larry Squiers, Douglas Stalcup, Carolyn Stegeman, Stephanie Stevens, Troy Stiff, Marcella Stoneking, Cynthia Stordahl, Amy Stottlemyre, Cynthia Stunkel, Steven Sturgeon, Kenneth Stwalley, Caryl Summers, Jason Sutton, Dana Terry, Linda Terry, Robert Tillotson, Deborah Treat, Mary Triggs, Leanne Trimble, Robert Tritt, Waiyee Tsang, Donna Tuescher, Richard Tuescher, William Turnage, Wanda Tyner, Chris Valverde, Mitchell Van Kam, Torri Van Kam, Elizabeth Vannaman, Lori Vander Waerdt, Steven Walker, David Walter, Sarah Welch, Deborah Welhoff, Harold Wenninghoff, Beverly Wessar, Brian White, Mary Wiese, Leslie Wiggins, Patrick Williams, Tamarie Williams, Brent Wineland, Kimberly Witt, Donald Woehrman, Dan Woods, Alice Wright, Scott Yungeberg. (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
January 24, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Michael L. Ferguson, Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Deborah A. Smith. (Rubinow, Laurie)
January 24, 2020 Filing 41 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Michael L. Ferguson, Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Deborah A. Smith.(Rubinow, Laurie)
January 24, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Area, Anna)
January 24, 2020 Filing 39 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by DST Systems, Inc..(Clayton, Lewis)
January 24, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Memorandum of Law in Support of Ruane's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Appointment of a Special Master). Document filed by DST Systems, Inc.. (Clayton, Lewis)
January 24, 2020 Filing 37 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent SS&C Technologies, Inc. for DST Systems, Inc.. Document filed by DST Systems, Inc..(Clayton, Lewis)
January 24, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua David Kaye on behalf of DST Systems, Inc.. (Kaye, Joshua)
January 24, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey John Recher on behalf of DST Systems, Inc.. (Recher, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis Richard Clayton on behalf of DST Systems, Inc.. (Clayton, Lewis)
January 24, 2020 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Chelle Adkins, Tracey Alden, Lisa Alexander, Scott Alexander, Roy Allen, Maria Alvarado, Alicia Andrews, Anne Arnold, Matthew Axton, Mark Ballew, Donna Barbour, Kevin Barclay, Juree Barkley, James Bates, Stephen Bay, Anne Beaulieu, Alicia Beckman, Gregg Bedell, Dianne Behney, Donald Belinger, Stacey Bell, Robert Berkstresser, Marci Bien-Aime, Phillip Biggs, Bernard Billesbach, Jennifer Bischoff, Gary Blanck, Kimberly Bolch, Christopher Bonjour, Kevin Bostick, Shalaine Bowen, Michael Brandt, William Brennecke, Margaret Broderick, Greg Brokaw, Russell Brooks, Wayne Brookshire, Vanessa Bross, Diane Brown, Michael Brummel, Tom Buechel, Alan Burgers, Kendra Burmaster, Julie Cansler, Tina Carey, Jeff Carroll, Christopher Carter, Donna Caswell, Jamie Clark, Royce Closterman, William Clower, Rebecca Clyma, Paul Coe, Dorothy Coffie, Robert Conklin, Louis Connell, Patrick Cook, Randy Cook, Alicia Costanzo, Thomas Coulter, Lisa Cracraft, Daniel Cranmer, Harry Crocker, Mary Cross, Matt Crosson, Carrie Crowder, Nakima Cutchlow, Carl Damron, Christopher Davis, Jacqueline Davis, Juan De Los Santos, Melanie Dillon, James Ducharme, Dennis Dunbar, Matthew Dunn, Sara Easterbrook, Thomas Edlund, William Edwards, David Eisenberger, Jennifer Eli, James Elliott, Stacey Elliott, Mary Espinoza, Melissa Ferguson, Joseph Filardo, Karla Floyd, Sara Fogt, Richard Fortune, Amy Francois, Barney Frazier, Janet Gamble-Duff, Kevin Garrett, Eric Garst, Leann Garvey, Billie Geer, Katherine Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Michael Giro, Bruce Goins, Stacey Goins, Cindy Gordanier, John Graves, Della Graybeal, Keely Grayson-Inman, Kenneth Hager, Barbara Ham, Jason Hamilton, William Hancock, Steven Harbert, John Harper, Jeffrey Harris, Rita Hartley, Craig Hewitt, Kelly Highfill, Kristy Hill, Jonathan Hinchee, Casey Holloway, Dianna Hoover, Joan Horan, Jodee Horseman, William Hottel, Jennifer House, Ruth Hughes, Theresa Hursh, Robert Hutter, Robert Hyberger, Amanda Hyland, Steven Inman, Jo Inzenga, Christopher Ithurburn, Camille Jackson, Reba Jackson, Jacqueline Jensen, Elizabeth Johanson, John Does 1-100, Kristine Johnson, WIlliam Johnson, Francis Jones, Susan Jones, Debra Kallenberger, Rodney Kane, Thomas Kane, Janet Kannard, Brenda Keeton, Amy Keller, Brian Kemp, Erin Kendall, Joseph Kenney, Darren Kinney, Phillip Klassen, Don Kleoppel, Stefan Kolev, Barry Krevitz, Lisa Kudrick, Cynthia Lair, Gary Lamy, Mary Lamy, Timothy Lane, Chad Lanning, James Laramy, Brent Larson, Jennifer Larson, Robert Lavalley, Patrick Lawless, Peggy Leineke, Michael Lovell, David Lovetere, Timothy Lyons, Alison Magathan, Ryan Magathan, Brian Majernik, Angie Manske, Meri Mason, Brent Mayberry, Kathleen McBride, Betsy McCollum, John McConnell, Jennifer McCord, Thomas McCullough, Thomas McDonnell, Julie McGivern, Cassaundra McKown, Mark McLaughlin, Jill McManus-Netwal, Brad McMillin, Stephanie McMillin, Shelley McMullin, Ingrid McNicholas, Amy Mcvay, Andrea Medina, Anthony Medina, Patricia Mergen, Daniel Meyer, Melissa Meyer, Kiva Miller, Melody Miser, Melanie Moentmann, Kathleen Moerschel, Michael Moffitt, Kevin Moll, Michael Murphy, Sarah Murphy, Heath Mustain, Karen Mustain, Patrick Nichols, Michelle O'Brien, Jackie Older-Hefner, Michael Oltmanns, David Operach, John Oswald, Jennifer Overholtzer, Karen Owens, Andrich Parker, Greg Parrish, Robert Parrott, Debra Payne, Percy Payne, Eric Pearce, Sandra Peoples, Patricia Pottinger, Nikki Powell, Roger Poynter, Loren Province, Deborah Quast, Fred Quatrocky, Benjamin Redwing, Breanne Redwing, Robert Redwing, Ashley Reik, Nancy Rellihan, Russell Revis, Ronald Reynolds, Joshua Rhodes, Leslie Riley, Edward Robinson, James Robinson, Denise Rojas, Derron Rolf, Nicholas Rutkowski, Martha Sabin, Diane Salinas, Mark Salyer, Davinia Santimano, Yvette Santimano, Kathleen Sarette, Lynn Sarowski, Kole Scarbrough, Charles Schell, Lawr Schellenberger, Sally Schlintz, Craig Schuerman, Shelly Schuerman, Travis Schulte, Deanna Schulz, Michael Sellers, Dennis Sessler, Anthony Shank, Randall Sharp, Dustain Shaw, James Ship, John Shultz, Dennis Simmons, Melissa Simpkins, Brian Slattery, Scott Slocum, Kristin Smithmier, Michael Spellman, Larry Squiers, Douglas Stalcup, Carolyn Stegeman, Stephanie Stevens, Troy Stiff, Marcella Stoneking, Cynthia Stordahl, Amy Stottlemyre, Cynthia Stunkel, Steven Sturgeon, Kenneth Stwalley, Caryl Summers, Jason Sutton, Dana Terry, Linda Terry, Robert Tillotson, Deborah Treat, Mary Triggs, Leanne Trimble, Robert Tritt, Waiyee Tsang, Donna Tuescher, Richard Tuescher, William Turnage, Wanda Tyner, Chris Valverde, Mitchell Van Kam, Torri Van Kam, Elizabeth Vannaman, Lori Vander Waerdt, Steven Walker, David Walter, Sarah Welch, Deborah Welhoff, Harold Wenninghoff, Beverly Wessar, Brian White, Mary Wiese, Leslie Wiggins, Patrick Williams, Tamarie Williams, Brent Wineland, Kimberly Witt, Donald Woehrman, Dan Woods, Alice Wright, Scott Yungeberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schermerhorn, Andrew)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #31 Motion for Anna Odella Area to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/23/2020) (rj)
January 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for Anna Odella Area to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 22, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Anna Odella Area to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 NY Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order)(Area, Anna)
January 21, 2020 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Robert J. Ward in Opposition re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from the Transcript dated October 10, 2018)(Ward, Robert)
January 21, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Ward, Robert)
January 21, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heidi Ann Wendel on behalf of Michael L. Ferguson, Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Deborah A. Smith. (Wendel, Heidi)
January 21, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laurie Rubinow on behalf of Michael L. Ferguson, Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Deborah A. Smith. (Rubinow, Laurie)
January 17, 2020 Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Andrew Schermerhorn dated January 17, 2020 re: Mendon/Canfield Defendant's Reply to Request for a Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Robert Canfield, Bonnie Kartz, Mark Mendon, Latrecia Onunkwor, David Ostermeyer, Jill Pehlman, Diana Weaver.(Schermerhorn, Andrew)
January 16, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Robert J. Ward of Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP dated January 16, 2020 re: Response to the Letter from Andrew Schermerhorn, dated January 13, 2020. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc..(Ward, Robert)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMO ENDORSEMENT RE MOTION OF ISIDRO MARISCAL FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #22 MOTION for Isidro Mariscal to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/14/2020) (jca)
January 13, 2020 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Andrew Schermerhorn dated January 13, 2020. Document filed by Robert Canfield, Bonnie Kartz, Mark Mendon, Latrecia Onunkwor, David Ostermeyer, Jill Pehlman, Diana Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schermerhorn, Andrew)
January 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Isidro Mariscal to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 13, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Isidro Mariscal to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 CA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Mariscal, Isidro) Modified on 1/13/2020 (vba). Modified on 1/13/2020 (bcu).
January 10, 2020 Filing 21 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Ward, Robert)
January 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 7, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 7, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-06685-ALC-BCM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 6, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Chelle Adkins, Tracey Alden, Lisa Alexander, Scott Alexander, Roy Allen, Maria Alvarado, Alicia Andrews, Anne Arnold, Matthew Axton, Mark Ballew, Donna Barbour, Kevin Barclay, Juree Barkley, James Bates, Stephen Bay, Anne Beaulieu, Alicia Beckman, Gregg Bedell, Dianne Behney, Donald Belinger, Stacey Bell, Robert Berkstresser, Marci Bien-Aime, Phillip Biggs, Bernard Billesbach, Jennifer Bischoff, Gary Blanck, Kimberly Bolch, Christopher Bonjour, Kevin Bostick, Shalaine Bowen, Michael Brandt, William Brennecke, Margaret Broderick, Greg Brokaw, Russell Brooks, Wayne Brookshire, Vanessa Bross, Diane Brown, Michael Brummel, Tom Buechel, Alan Burgers, Kendra Burmaster, Julie Cansler, Tina Carey, Jeff Carroll, Christopher Carter, Donna Caswell, Jamie Clark, Royce Closterman, William Clower, Rebecca Clyma, Paul Coe, Dorothy Coffie, Robert Conklin, Louis Connell, Patrick Cook, Randy Cook, Alicia Costanzo, Thomas Coulter, Lisa Cracraft, Daniel Cranmer, Harry Crocker, Mary Cross, Matt Crosson, Carrie Crowder, Nakima Cutchlow, Carl Damron, Christopher Davis, Jacqueline Davis, Juan De Los Santos, Melanie Dillon, James Ducharme, Dennis Dunbar, Matthew Dunn, Sara Easterbrook, Thomas Edlund, William Edwards, David Eisenberger, Jennifer Eli, James Elliott, Stacey Elliott, Mary Espinoza, Melissa Ferguson, Joseph Filardo, Karla Floyd, Sara Fogt, Richard Fortune, Amy Francois, Barney Frazier, Janet Gamble-Duff, Kevin Garrett, Eric Garst, Leann Garvey, Billie Geer, Katherine Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Michael Giro, Bruce Goins, Stacey Goins, Cindy Gordanier, John Graves, Della Graybeal, Keely Grayson-Inman, Kenneth Hager, Barbara Ham, Jason Hamilton, William Hancock, Steven Harbert, John Harper, Jeffrey Harris, Rita Hartley, Craig Hewitt, Kelly Highfill, Kristy Hill, Jonathan Hinchee, Casey Holloway, Dianna Hoover, Joan Horan, Jodee Horseman, William Hottel, Jennifer House, Ruth Hughes, Theresa Hursh, Robert Hutter, Robert Hyberger, Amanda Hyland, Steven Inman, Jo Inzenga, Christopher Ithurburn, Camille Jackson, Reba Jackson, Jacqueline Jensen, Elizabeth Johanson, John Does 1-100, Kristine Johnson, WIlliam Johnson, Francis Jones, Susan Jones, Debra Kallenberger, Rodney Kane, Thomas Kane, Janet Kannard, Brenda Keeton, Amy Keller, Brian Kemp, Erin Kendall, Joseph Kenney, Darren Kinney, Phillip Klassen, Don Kleoppel, Stefan Kolev, Barry Krevitz, Lisa Kudrick, Cynthia Lair, Gary Lamy, Mary Lamy, Timothy Lane, Chad Lanning, James Laramy, Brent Larson, Jennifer Larson, Robert Lavalley, Patrick Lawless, Peggy Leineke, Michael Lovell, David Lovetere, Timothy Lyons, Alison Magathan, Ryan Magathan, Brian Majernik, Angie Manske, Meri Mason, Brent Mayberry, Kathleen McBride, Betsy McCollum, John McConnell, Jennifer McCord, Thomas McCullough, Thomas McDonnell, Julie McGivern, Cassaundra McKown, Mark McLaughlin, Jill McManus-Netwal, Brad McMillin, Stephanie McMillin, Shelley McMullin, Ingrid McNicholas, Amy Mcvay, Andrea Medina, Anthony Medina, Patricia Mergen, Daniel Meyer, Melissa Meyer, Kiva Miller, Melody Miser, Melanie Moentmann, Kathleen Moerschel, Michael Moffitt, Kevin Moll, Michael Murphy, Sarah Murphy, Heath Mustain, Karen Mustain, Patrick Nichols, Michelle O'Brien, Jackie Older-Hefner, Michael Oltmanns, David Operach, John Oswald, Jennifer Overholtzer, Karen Owens, Andrich Parker, Greg Parrish, Robert Parrott, Debra Payne, Percy Payne, Eric Pearce, Sandra Peoples, Patricia Pottinger, Nikki Powell, Roger Poynter, Loren Province, Deborah Quast, Fred Quatrocky, Benjamin Redwing, Breanne Redwing, Robert Redwing, Ashley Reik, Nancy Rellihan, Russell Revis, Ronald Reynolds, Joshua Rhodes, Leslie Riley, Edward Robinson, James Robinson, Denise Rojas, Derron Rolf, Nicholas Rutkowski, Martha Sabin, Diane Salinas, Mark Salyer, Davinia Santimano, Yvette Santimano, Kathleen Sarette, Lynn Sarowski, Kole Scarbrough, Charles Schell, Lawr Schellenberger, Sally Schlintz, Craig Schuerman, Shelly Schuerman, Travis Schulte, Deanna Schulz, Michael Sellers, Dennis Sessler, Anthony Shank, Randall Sharp, Dustain Shaw, James Ship, John Shultz, Dennis Simmons, Melissa Simpkins, Brian Slattery, Scott Slocum, Kristin Smithmier, Michael Spellman, Larry Squiers, Douglas Stalcup, Carolyn Stegeman, Stephanie Stevens, Troy Stiff, Marcella Stoneking, Cynthia Stordahl, Amy Stottlemyre, Cynthia Stunkel, Steven Sturgeon, Kenneth Stwalley, Caryl Summers, Jason Sutton, Dana Terry, Linda Terry, Robert Tillotson, Deborah Treat, Mary Triggs, Leanne Trimble, Robert Tritt, Waiyee Tsang, Donna Tuescher, Richard Tuescher, William Turnage, Wanda Tyner, Chris Valverde, Mitchell Van Kam, Torri Van Kam, Elizabeth Vannaman, Lori Vander Waerdt, Steven Walker, David Walter, Diana Weaver, Sarah Welch, Deborah Welhoff, Harold Wenninghoff, Beverly Wessar, Brian White, Mary Wiese, Leslie Wiggins, Patrick Williams, Tamarie Williams, Brent Wineland, Kimberly Witt, Donald Woehrman, Dan Woods, Alice Wright, Scott Yungeberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schermerhorn, Andrew)
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Chelle Adkins, Tracey Alden, Lisa Alexander, Scott Alexander, Roy Allen, Maria Alvarado, Alicia Andrews, Anne Arnold, Matthew Axton, Mark Ballew, Donna Barbour, Kevin Barclay, Juree Barkley, James Bates, Stephen Bay, Anne Beaulieu, Alicia Beckman, Gregg Bedell, Dianne Behney, Donald Belinger, Stacey Bell, Robert Berkstresser, Marci Bien-Aime, Phillip Biggs, Bernard Billesbach, Jennifer Bischoff, Gary Blanck, Kimberly Bolch, Christopher Bonjour, Kevin Bostick, Shalaine Bowen, Michael Brandt, William Brennecke, Margaret Broderick, Greg Brokaw, Russell Brooks, Wayne Brookshire, Vanessa Bross, Diane Brown, Michael Brummel, Tom Buechel, Alan Burgers, Kendra Burmaster, Julie Cansler, Tina Carey, Jeff Carroll, Christopher Carter, Donna Caswell, Jamie Clark, Royce Closterman, William Clower, Rebecca Clyma, Paul Coe, Dorothy Coffie, Robert Conklin, Louis Connell, Patrick Cook, Randy Cook, Alicia Costanzo, Thomas Coulter, Lisa Cracraft, Daniel Cranmer, Harry Crocker, Mary Cross, Matt Crosson, Carrie Crowder, Nakima Cutchlow, Carl Damron, Christopher Davis, Jacqueline Davis, Juan De Los Santos, Melanie Dillon, James Ducharme, Dennis Dunbar, Matthew Dunn, Sara Easterbrook, Thomas Edlund, William Edwards, David Eisenberger, Jennifer Eli, James Elliott, Stacey Elliott, Mary Espinoza, Melissa Ferguson, Joseph Filardo, Karla Floyd, Sara Fogt, Richard Fortune, Amy Francois, Barney Frazier, Janet Gamble-Duff, Kevin Garrett, Eric Garst, Leann Garvey, Billie Geer, Katherine Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Michael Giro, Bruce Goins, Stacey Goins, Cindy Gordanier, John Graves, Della Graybeal, Keely Grayson-Inman, Kenneth Hager, Barbara Ham, Jason Hamilton, William Hancock, Steven Harbert, John Harper, Jeffrey Harris, Rita Hartley, Craig Hewitt, Kelly Highfill, Kristy Hill, Jonathan Hinchee, Casey Holloway, Dianna Hoover, Joan Horan, Jodee Horseman, William Hottel, Jennifer House, Ruth Hughes, Theresa Hursh, Robert Hutter, Robert Hyberger, Amanda Hyland, Steven Inman, Jo Inzenga, Christopher Ithurburn, Camille Jackson, Reba Jackson, Jacqueline Jensen, Elizabeth Johanson, John Does 1-100, Kristine Johnson, WIlliam Johnson, Francis Jones, Susan Jones, Debra Kallenberger, Rodney Kane, Thomas Kane, Janet Kannard, Brenda Keeton, Amy Keller, Brian Kemp, Erin Kendall, Joseph Kenney, Darren Kinney, Phillip Klassen, Don Kleoppel, Stefan Kolev, Barry Krevitz, Lisa Kudrick, Cynthia Lair, Gary Lamy, Mary Lamy, Timothy Lane, Chad Lanning, James Laramy, Brent Larson, Jennifer Larson, Robert Lavalley, Patrick Lawless, Peggy Leineke, Michael Lovell, David Lovetere, Timothy Lyons, Alison Magathan, Ryan Magathan, Brian Majernik, Angie Manske, Meri Mason, Brent Mayberry, Kathleen McBride, Betsy McCollum, John McConnell, Jennifer McCord, Thomas McCullough, Thomas McDonnell, Julie McGivern, Cassaundra McKown, Mark McLaughlin, Jill McManus-Netwal, Brad McMillin, Stephanie McMillin, Shelley McMullin, Ingrid McNicholas, Amy Mcvay, Andrea Medina, Anthony Medina, Patricia Mergen, Daniel Meyer, Melissa Meyer, Kiva Miller, Melody Miser, Melanie Moentmann, Kathleen Moerschel, Michael Moffitt, Kevin Moll, Michael Murphy, Sarah Murphy, Heath Mustain, Karen Mustain, Patrick Nichols, Michelle O'Brien, Jackie Older-Hefner, Michael Oltmanns, David Operach, John Oswald, Jennifer Overholtzer, Karen Owens, Andrich Parker, Greg Parrish, Robert Parrott, Debra Payne, Percy Payne, Eric Pearce, Sandra Peoples, Patricia Pottinger, Nikki Powell, Roger Poynter, Loren Province, Deborah Quast, Fred Quatrocky, Benjamin Redwing, Breanne Redwing, Robert Redwing, Ashley Reik, Nancy Rellihan, Russell Revis, Ronald Reynolds, Joshua Rhodes, Leslie Riley, Edward Robinson, James Robinson, Denise Rojas, Derron Rolf, Nicholas Rutkowski, Martha Sabin, Diane Salinas, Mark Salyer, Davinia Santimano, Yvette Santimano, Kathleen Sarette, Lynn Sarowski, Kole Scarbrough, Charles Schell, Lawr Schellenberger, Sally Schlintz, Craig Schuerman, Shelly Schuerman, Travis Schulte, Deanna Schulz, Michael Sellers, Dennis Sessler, Anthony Shank, Randall Sharp, Dustain Shaw, James Ship, John Shultz, Dennis Simmons, Melissa Simpkins, Brian Slattery, Scott Slocum, Kristin Smithmier, Michael Spellman, Larry Squiers, Douglas Stalcup, Carolyn Stegeman, Stephanie Stevens, Troy Stiff, Marcella Stoneking, Cynthia Stordahl, Amy Stottlemyre, Cynthia Stunkel, Steven Sturgeon, Kenneth Stwalley, Caryl Summers, Jason Sutton, Dana Terry, Linda Terry, Robert Tillotson, Deborah Treat, Mary Triggs, Leanne Trimble, Robert Tritt, Waiyee Tsang, Donna Tuescher, Richard Tuescher, William Turnage, Wanda Tyner, Chris Valverde, Mitchell Van Kam, Torri Van Kam, Elizabeth Vannaman, Lori Vander Waerdt, Steven Walker, David Walter, Diana Weaver, Sarah Welch, Deborah Welhoff, Harold Wenninghoff, Beverly Wessar, Brian White, Mary Wiese, Leslie Wiggins, Patrick Williams, Tamarie Williams, Brent Wineland, Kimberly Witt, Donald Woehrman, Dan Woods, Alice Wright, Scott Yungeberg.(Schermerhorn, Andrew)
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua B Katz on behalf of Robert Canfield, Bonnie Kartz, Mark Mendon, Latrecia Onunkwor, David Ostermeyer, Jill Pehlman, Diana Weaver. (Katz, Joshua)
January 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Andrew Schermerhorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 6, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Andrew Schermerhorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chelle Adkins, Tracey Alden, Lisa Alexander, Scott Alexander, Roy Allen, Maria Alvarado, Alicia Andrews, Anne Arnold, Matthew Axton, Mark Ballew, Donna Barbour, Kevin Barclay, Juree Barkley, James Bates, Stephen Bay, Anne Beaulieu, Alicia Beckman, Gregg Bedell, Dianne Behney, Donald Belinger, Stacey Bell, Robert Berkstresser, Marci Bien-Aime, Phillip Biggs, Bernard Billesbach, Jennifer Bischoff, Gary Blanck, Kimberly Bolch, Christopher Bonjour, Kevin Bostick, Shalaine Bowen, Michael Brandt, William Brennecke, Margaret Broderick, Greg Brokaw, Russell Brooks, Wayne Brookshire, Vanessa Bross, Diane Brown, Michael Brummel, Tom Buechel, Alan Burgers, Kendra Burmaster, Robert Canfield, Julie Cansler, Tina Carey, Jeff Carroll, Christopher Carter, Donna Caswell, Jamie Clark, Royce Closterman, William Clower, Rebecca Clyma, Paul Coe, Dorothy Coffie, Robert Conklin, Louis Connell, Patrick Cook, Randy Cook, Alicia Costanzo, Thomas Coulter, Lisa Cracraft, Daniel Cranmer, Harry Crocker, Mary Cross, Matt Crosson, Carrie Crowder, Nakima Cutchlow, DST Systems, Inc., Carl Damron, Christopher Davis, Jacqueline Davis, Juan De Los Santos, Melanie Dillon, James Ducharme, Dennis Dunbar, Matthew Dunn, Sara Easterbrook, Thomas Edlund, William Edwards, David Eisenberger, Jennifer Eli, James Elliott, Stacey Elliott, Mary Espinoza, Melissa Ferguson, Joseph Filardo, Karla Floyd, Sara Fogt, Richard Fortune, Amy Francois, Barney Frazier, Janet Gamble-Duff, Kevin Garrett, Eric Garst, Leann Garvey, Billie Geer, Katherine Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Michael Giro, Bruce Goins, Stacey Goins, Cindy Gordanier, John Graves, Della Graybeal, Keely Grayson-Inman, Kenneth Hager, Barbara Ham, Jason Hamilton, William Hancock, Steven Harbert, John Harper, Jeffrey Harris, Rita Hartley, Craig Hewitt, Kelly Highfill, Kristy Hill, Jonathan Hinchee, Casey Holloway, Dianna Hoover, Joan Horan, Jodee Horseman, William Hottel, Jennifer House, Ruth Hughes, Theresa Hursh, Robert Hutter, Robert Hyberger, Amanda Hyland, Steven Inman, Jo Inzenga, Christopher Ithurburn, Camille Jackson, Reba Jackson, Jacqueline Jensen, Elizabeth Johanson, John Does 1-100, Kristine Johnson, WIlliam Johnson, Francis Jones, Susan Jones, Debra Kallenberger, Rodney Kane, Thomas Kane, Janet Kannard, Bonnie Kartz, Brenda Keeton, Amy Keller, Brian Kemp, Erin Kendall, Joseph Kenney, Darren Kinney, Phillip Klassen, Don Kleoppel, Stefan Kolev, Barry Krevitz, Lisa Kudrick, Cynthia Lair, Gary Lamy, Mary Lamy, Timothy Lane, Chad Lanning, James Laramy, Brent Larson, Jennifer Larson, Robert Lavalley, Patrick Lawless, Peggy Leineke, Michael Lovell, David Lovetere, Timothy Lyons, Alison Magathan, Ryan Magathan, Brian Majernik, Angie Manske, Meri Mason, Brent Mayberry, Kathleen McBride, Betsy McCollum, John McConnell, Jennifer McCord, Thomas McCullough, Thomas McDonnell, Julie McGivern, Cassaundra McKown, Mark McLaughlin, Jill McManus-Netwal, Brad McMillin, Stephanie McMillin, Shelley McMullin, Ingrid McNicholas, Amy Mcvay, Andrea Medina, Anthony Medina, Mark Mendon, Patricia Mergen, Daniel Meyer, Melissa Meyer, Kiva Miller, Melody Miser, Melanie Moentmann, Kathleen Moerschel, Michael Moffitt, Kevin Moll, Michael Murphy, Sarah Murphy, Heath Mustain, Karen Mustain, Patrick Nichols, Michelle O'Brien, Jackie Older-Hefner, Michael Oltmanns, Latrecia Onunkwor, David Operach, David Ostermeyer, John Oswald, Jennifer Overholtzer, Karen Owens, Andrich Parker, Greg Parrish, Robert Parrott, Debra Payne, Percy Payne, Eric Pearce, Jill Pehlman, Sandra Peoples, Patricia Pottinger, Nikki Powell, Roger Poynter, Loren Province, Deborah Quast, Fred Quatrocky, Benjamin Redwing, Breanne Redwing, Robert Redwing, Ashley Reik, Nancy Rellihan, Russell Revis, Ronald Reynolds, Joshua Rhodes, Leslie Riley, Edward Robinson, James Robinson, Denise Rojas, Derron Rolf, Nicholas Rutkowski, Martha Sabin, Diane Salinas, Mark Salyer, Davinia Santimano, Yvette Santimano, Kathleen Sarette, Lynn Sarowski, Kole Scarbrough, Charles Schell, Lawr Schellenberger, Sally Schlintz, Craig Schuerman, Shelly Schuerman, Travis Schulte, Deanna Schulz, Michael Sellers, Dennis Sessler, Anthony Shank, Randall Sharp, Dustain Shaw, James Ship, John Shultz, Dennis Simmons, Melissa Simpkins, Brian Slattery, Scott Slocum, Kristin Smithmier, Michael Spellman, Larry Squiers, Douglas Stalcup, Carolyn Stegeman, Stephanie Stevens, Troy Stiff, Marcella Stoneking, Cynthia Stordahl, Amy Stottlemyre, Cynthia Stunkel, Steven Sturgeon, Kenneth Stwalley, Caryl Summers, Jason Sutton, Dana Terry, Linda Terry, Robert Tillotson, Deborah Treat, Mary Triggs, Leanne Trimble, Robert Tritt, Waiyee Tsang, Donna Tuescher, Richard Tuescher, William Turnage, Wanda Tyner, Chris Valverde, Mitchell Van Kam, Torri Van Kam, Elizabeth Vannaman, Lori Vander Waerdt, Steven Walker, David Walter, Diana Weaver, Sarah Welch, Deborah Welhoff, Harold Wenninghoff, Beverly Wessar, Brian White, Mary Wiese, Leslie Wiggins, Patrick Williams, Tamarie Williams, Brent Wineland, Kimberly Witt, Donald Woehrman, Dan Woods, Alice Wright, Scott Yungeberg. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Cert. of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order)(Schermerhorn, Andrew)
January 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #16 MOTION for Andrew Schermerhorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18429279. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Andrew Schermerhorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18429279. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chelle Adkins, Tracey Alden, Lisa Alexander, Scott Alexander, Roy Allen, Maria Alvarado, Alicia Andrews, Anne Arnold, Matthew Axton, Mark Ballew, Donna Barbour, Kevin Barclay, Juree Barkley, James Bates, Stephen Bay, Anne Beaulieu, Alicia Beckman, Gregg Bedell, Dianne Behney, Donald Belinger, Stacey Bell, Robert Berkstresser, Marci Bien-Aime, Phillip Biggs, Bernard Billesbach, Jennifer Bischoff, Gary Blanck, Kimberly Bolch, Christopher Bonjour, Kevin Bostick, Shalaine Bowen, Michael Brandt, William Brennecke, Margaret Broderick, Greg Brokaw, Russell Brooks, Wayne Brookshire, Vanessa Bross, Diane Brown, Michael Brummel, Tom Buechel, Alan Burgers, Kendra Burmaster, Robert Canfield, Julie Cansler, Tina Carey, Jeff Carroll, Christopher Carter, Donna Caswell, Jamie Clark, Royce Closterman, William Clower, Rebecca Clyma, Paul Coe, Dorothy Coffie, Robert Conklin, Louis Connell, Patrick Cook, Randy Cook, Alicia Costanzo, Thomas Coulter, Lisa Cracraft, Daniel Cranmer, Harry Crocker, Mary Cross, Matt Crosson, Carrie Crowder, Nakima Cutchlow, Carl Damron, Christopher Davis, Jacqueline Davis, Juan De Los Santos, Melanie Dillon, James Ducharme, Dennis Dunbar, Matthew Dunn, Sara Easterbrook, Thomas Edlund, William Edwards, David Eisenberger, Jennifer Eli, James Elliott, Stacey Elliott, Mary Espinoza, Melissa Ferguson, Joseph Filardo, Karla Floyd, Sara Fogt, Richard Fortune, Amy Francois, Barney Frazier, Janet Gamble-Duff, Kevin Garrett, Eric Garst, Leann Garvey, Billie Geer, Katherine Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Michael Giro, Bruce Goins, Stacey Goins, Cindy Gordanier, John Graves, Della Graybeal, Keely Grayson-Inman, Kenneth Hager, Barbara Ham, Jason Hamilton, William Hancock, Steven Harbert, John Harper, Jeffrey Harris, Rita Hartley, Craig Hewitt, Kelly Highfill, Kristy Hill, Jonathan Hinchee, Casey Holloway, Dianna Hoover, Joan Horan, Jodee Horseman, William Hottel, Jennifer House, Ruth Hughes, Theresa Hursh, Robert Hutter, Robert Hyberger, Amanda Hyland, Steven Inman, Jo Inzenga, Christopher Ithurburn, Camille Jackson, Reba Jackson, Jacqueline Jensen, Elizabeth Johanson, John Does 1-100, Kristine Johnson, WIlliam Johnson, Francis Jones, Susan Jones, Debra Kallenberger, Rodney Kane, Thomas Kane, Janet Kannard, Bonnie Kartz, Brenda Keeton, Amy Keller, Brian Kemp, Erin Kendall, Joseph Kenney, Darren Kinney, Phillip Klassen, Don Kleoppel, Stefan Kolev, Barry Krevitz, Lisa Kudrick, Cynthia Lair, Gary Lamy, Mary Lamy, Timothy Lane, Chad Lanning, James Laramy, Brent Larson, Jennifer Larson, Robert Lavalley, Patrick Lawless, Peggy Leineke, Michael Lovell, David Lovetere, Timothy Lyons, Alison Magathan, Ryan Magathan, Brian Majernik, Angie Manske, Meri Mason, Brent Mayberry, Kathleen McBride, Betsy McCollum, John McConnell, Jennifer McCord, Thomas McCullough, Thomas McDonnell, Julie McGivern, Cassaundra McKown, Mark McLaughlin, Jill McManus-Netwal, Brad McMillin, Stephanie McMillin, Shelley McMullin, Ingrid McNicholas, Amy Mcvay, Andrea Medina, Anthony Medina, Mark Mendon, Patricia Mergen, Daniel Meyer, Melissa Meyer, Kiva Miller, Melody Miser, Melanie Moentmann, Kathleen Moerschel, Michael Moffitt, Kevin Moll, Michael Murphy, Sarah Murphy, Heath Mustain, Karen Mustain, Patrick Nichols, Michelle O'Brien, Jackie Older-Hefner, Michael Oltmanns, Latrecia Onunkwor, David Operach, David Ostermeyer, John Oswald, Jennifer Overholtzer, Karen Owens, Andrich Parker, Greg Parrish, Robert Parrott, Debra Payne, Percy Payne, Eric Pearce, Jill Pehlman, Sandra Peoples, Patricia Pottinger, Nikki Powell, Roger Poynter, Loren Province, Deborah Quast, Fred Quatrocky, Benjamin Redwing, Breanne Redwing, Robert Redwing, Ashley Reik, Nancy Rellihan, Russell Revis, Ronald Reynolds, Joshua Rhodes, Leslie Riley, Edward Robinson, James Robinson, Denise Rojas, Derron Rolf, Nicholas Rutkowski, Martha Sabin, Diane Salinas, Mark Salyer, Davinia Santimano, Yvette Santimano, Kathleen Sarette, Lynn Sarowski, Kole Scarbrough, Charles Schell, Lawr Schellenberger, Sally Schlintz, Craig Schuerman, Shelly Schuerman, Travis Schulte, Deanna Schulz, Michael Sellers, Dennis Sessler, Anthony Shank, Randall Sharp, Dustain Shaw, James Ship, John Shultz, Dennis Simmons, Melissa Simpkins, Brian Slattery, Scott Slocum, Kristin Smithmier, Michael Spellman, Larry Squiers, Douglas Stalcup, Carolyn Stegeman, Stephanie Stevens, Troy Stiff, Marcella Stoneking, Cynthia Stordahl, Amy Stottlemyre, Cynthia Stunkel, Steven Sturgeon, Kenneth Stwalley, Caryl Summers, Jason Sutton, Dana Terry, Linda Terry, Robert Tillotson, Deborah Treat, Mary Triggs, Leanne Trimble, Robert Tritt, Waiyee Tsang, Donna Tuescher, Richard Tuescher, William Turnage, Wanda Tyner, Chris Valverde, Mitchell Van Kam, Torri Van Kam, Elizabeth Vannaman, Lori Vander Waerdt, Steven Walker, David Walter, Sarah Welch, Deborah Welhoff, Harold Wenninghoff, Beverly Wessar, Brian White, Mary Wiese, Leslie Wiggins, Patrick Williams, Tamarie Williams, Brent Wineland, Kimberly Witt, Donald Woehrman, Dan Woods, Alice Wright, Scott Yungeberg. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Cert. of Good Standing)(Schermerhorn, Andrew) Modified on 1/6/2020 (bcu).
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Ward, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Ward, Robert)
December 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert J. Ward to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; parties previously issued a summons require an Amended summons filed separately from new parties who require a standard summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
December 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert J. Ward. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Louis Connell; Lawr (Lawrence) Schellenberger. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Ward, Robert)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc..(Ward, Robert)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALICIA ANDREWS, MARCI BIEN-AIME, KIMBERLY BOLCH, MICHAEL BRUMMEL, CHRISTOPHER DAVIS, DENNIS DUNBAR, DAVID EISENBERGER, STACEY ELLIOTT, BARBARA HAM, ROBERT HYBERGER, NIKKI POWELL, JOSHUA RHODES, AMY KELLER, STEVEN INMAN, KIVA MILLER, ASHLEY REIK, ERIC PEARCE, LEANNE TRIMBLE, AMY STOTTLEMYRE, MICHAEL MURPHY, ANTHONY MEDINA, STEPHANIE MCMILLIN, KEELY GRAYSON-INMAN, BRAD MCMILLIN, CARYL SUMMERS, JOHN HARPER, TIMOTHY LANE, WANDA TYNER, ERIC GARST, WAIYEE TSANG, KRISTIN SMITHMIER, ANNE ARNOLD, STEVEN STURGEON, DIANE BROWN, STEPHANIE STEVENS, ROGER POYNTER, BARNEY FRAZIER, LISA ALEXANDER, STACEY BELL, MARK BALLEW, MARIA ALVARADO, CARL DAMRON, CYNTHIA STUNKEL, DONNA TUESCHER, RICHARD TUESCHER, WILLIAM CLOWER, CAROLYN STEGEMAN, ROBERT TILLOTSON, PATRICK COOK, TAMARIE WILLIAMS, MARCELLA STONEKING DEBORAH TREAT, SHALAINE BOWEN, LESLIE WIGGINS, DEBRA PAYNE, ROYCE CLOSTERMAN, DEBORAH WELHOFF, ROBERT TRITT, SARAH MURPHY, BARRY KREVITZ, DIANNA HOOVER, KAREN OWENS, KATHLEEN MCBRIDE, CAMILLE JACKSON, BREANNE REDWING, JAMES SHIP, NANCY RELLIHAN, KATHERINE GILLESPIE, MELANIE MOENTMANN, FRED QUATROCKY, MARK MCLAUGHLIN, JENNIFER OVERHOLTZER, BETSY MCCOLLUM, JOSEPH KENNEY, MARY LAMY, LESLIE RILEY, KATHLEEN MOERSCHEL, DEANNA SCHULZ DAN WOODS, CYNTHIA LAIR, LAWR (LAWRENCE) SCHELLENBERGER, MICHAEL OLTMANNS, KAREN MUSTAIN, AMY MCVAY, CHAD LANNING, SUSAN JONES, KENNETH STWALLEY, REBECCA CLYMA MARY WIESE, DONNA CASWELL, SARAH WELCH CARRIE CROWDER, DANA TERRY, TROY STIFF, CHRISTOPHER CARTER, PATRICK WILLIAMS, SANDRA PEOPLES, LISA CRACRAFT, PAUL COE SARA FOGT, ELIZABETH VANNAMAN, HAROLD WENNINGHOFF, CHRIS VALVERDE, ANDRICH PARKER, WILLIAM TURNAGE, MELISSA SIMPKINS, LORI VANDER WAERDT, ALICIA COSTANZO, BRENT WINELAND, MELANIE DILLON, AMY FRANCOIS, CHRISTOPHER BONJOUR, JAMES BATES, WILLIAM BRENNECKE, MICHAEL BRANDT, GARY BLANCK CHELLE ADKINS, PHILLIP BIGGS, RUSSELL BROOKS LOREN PROVINCE, KEVIN GARRETT, KEVIN BARCLAY, NAKIMA CUTCHLOW, JENNIFER ELI, LARRY SQUIERS, GREGG BEDELL, MARY ESPINOZA, ROY ALLEN, MARY CROSS, MATTHEW AXTON, JAMES ELLIOTT, JANET GAMBLE-DUFF, RONALD REYNOLDS, THOMAS KANE, JACQUELINE JENSEN, INGRID MCNICHOLAS, TIMOTHY LYONS, MICHELLE O'BRIEN, RUTH HUGHES, SHELLY SCHUERMAN, WILLIAM HANCOCK, CASSAUNDRA MCKOWN, THOMAS MCCULLOUGH, MARK SALYER, EDWARD ROBINSON, BERNARD BILLESBACH, MELISSA MEYER, JONATHAN HINCHEE, RITA HARTLEY, CRAIG SCHUERMAN, JOHN GRAVES, ROBERT LAVALLEY, STACEY GOINS, DARREN KINNEY, REBA JACKSON, FRANCIS JONES, DENNIS SIMMONS, JODEE HORSEMAN, BRUCE GOINS, WILLIAM HOTTEL, CASEY HOLLOWAY, JOHN OSWALD, DAVINIA SANTIMANO, RANDALL SHARP, DENNIS SESSLER, JULIE MCGIVERN, ANDREA MEDINA, JENNIFER MCCORD, DANIEL MEYER, AMANDA HYLAND, BRENDA KEETON, DERRON ROLF, JILL MCMANUS-NETWAL, MICHAEL MOFFITT, PATRICK LAWLESS, MICHAEL GILLESPIE, BENJAMIN REDWING, PHILLIP KLASSEN, JENNIFER LARSON, KIMBERLY WITT, THOMAS MCDONNELL, PATRICIA MERGEN, ERIN KENDALL, DELLA GRAYBEAL, ROBERT REDWING, ROBERT BERKSTRESSER, JOSEPH FILARDO, DONALD WOEHRMAN, DEBRA KALLENBERGER, KRISTY HILL, JO INZENGA, JACKIE OLDER-HEFNER, MICHAEL GIRO, PATRICK NICHOLS, MICHAEL SELLERS, ANGIE MANSKE, HEATH MUSTAIN, BRIAN KEMP, JACQUELINE DAVIS, WILLIAM EDWARDS, WILLIAM JOHNSON, ANNE BEAULIEU, RANDY COOK, JAMES LARAMY, KARLA FLOYD, PEGGY LEINEKE, CRAIG HEWITT, BEVERLY WESSAR, DIANE SALINAS, ROBERT HUTTER, CHRISTOPHER ITHURBURN, DUSTAIN SHAW, THOMAS EDLUND, ALICIA BECKMAN, SARA EASTERBROOK, DANIEL CRANMER, KATHLEEN SARETTE, ELIZABETH JOHANSON, TOM BUECHEL, MICHAEL SPELLMAN, GREG PARRISH, JUREE BARKLEY, MATT CROSSON, JAMES DUCHARME, HARRY CROCKER, KEVIN MOLL, LINDA TERRY, JAMIE CLARK, BILLIE GEER, CYNTHIA STORDAHL, JULIE CANSLER, DAVID OPERACH, MICHAEL LOVELL, DENISE ROJAS, DOROTHY COFFIE, THOMAS COULTER, DAVID WALTER, RICHARD FORTUNE, ROBERT PARROTT, DAVID LOVETERE, MERI MASON, RODNEY KANE, JAMES ROBINSON RYAN MAGATHAN, ALISON MAGATHAN, NICHOLAS RUTKOWSKI, SALLY SCHLINTZ, STEVEN HARBERT, RUSSELL REVIS, CINDY GORDANIER, SCOTT YUNGEBERG, JOAN HORAN, YVETTE SANTIMANO, ANTHONY SHANK, DON KLEOPPEL, MELODY MISER JASON HAMILTON, ALICE WRIGHT, GREG BROKAW, BRIAN MAJERNIK, GARY LAMY, JENNIFER HOUSE JOHN MCCONNELL, JEFFREY HARRIS, THERESA HURSH, ALAN BURGERS, DONALD BELINGER, STEVEN WALKER, KEVIN BOSTICK, MELISSA FERGUSON, TRACY ALDEN, JEFF CARROLL, DEBORAH QUAST, WAYNE BROOKSHIRE, ROBERT CONKLIN, TINA CAREY, VANESSA BROSS, MARTHA SABIN, SHELLEY MCMULLIN, BRENT LARSON, JANET KANNARD, KOLE SCARBROUGH, TRAVIS SCHULTE, KENNETH HAGER, LISA KUDRICK, CHARLES SCHELL STEFAN KOLEV, JUAN DE LOS SANTOS, MITCHELL VAN KAM, LOUIS CONNELL, DOUGLAS STALCUP, JASON SUTTON, BRIAN SLATTERY, MARGARET BRODERICK, SCOTT SLOCUM, STEPHEN BAY, JENNIFER BISCHOFF, KENDRA BURMASTER, DONNA BARBOUR, MATTHEW DUNN, SCOTT ALEXANDER, LEANN GARVEY, KEVIN MOLL, JOHN SHULTZ, BRENT MAYBERRY, LYNN SAROWSKI, KELLY HIGHFILL, KRISTINE JOHNSON, BRIAN WHITE, DIANNE BEHNEY, KRISTY HILL, MARY TRIGGS, PATRICIA POTTINGER, TORRI VAN KAM, ROBERT CANFIELD, BONNIE KARTZ, LATRECIA ONUNKWOR, DIANA WEAVER, DAVID OSTERMEYER, MARK MENDON, and JILL PEHLMAN, re: #10 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum A)(Ward, Robert) Modified on 12/19/2019 (sj).
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Robert Canfield, DST Systems, Inc., Michael L. Ferguson, Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Bonnie Kartz, Mark Mendon, Latrecia Onunkwor, David Ostermeyer, Percy Payne, Jill Pehlman, Eugene Scalia, Deborah A. Smith, Diana Weaver, Alicia Andrews, Marci Bien-Aime, Kimberly Bolch, Michael Brummel, Christopher Davis, Dennis Dunbar, David Eisenberger, Stacey Elliott, Barbara Ham, Robert Hyberger, Nikki Powell, Joshua Rhodes, Amy Keller, Steven Inman, Kiva Miller, Ashley Reik, Eric Pearce, Leanne Trimble, Amy Stottlemyre, Michael Murphy, Anthony Medina, Stephanie McMillin, Keely Grayson-Inman, Brad McMillin, Caryl Summers, John Harper, Timothy Lane, Wanda Tyner, Eric Garst, Waiyee Tsang, Kristin Smithmier, Anne Arnold, Steven Sturgeon, Diane Brown, Stephanie Stevens, Roger Poynter, Barney Frazier, Lisa Alexander, Stacey Bell, Mark Ballew, Maria Alvarado, Carl Damron, Cynthia Stunkel, Donna Tuescher, Richard Tuescher, William Clower, Carolyn Stegeman, Robert Tillotson, Patrick Cook, Tamarie Williams, Marcella Stoneking, Deborah Treat, Shalaine Bowen, Leslie Wiggins, Debra Payne, Royce Closterman, Deborah Welhoff, Robert Tritt, Sarah Murphy, Barry Krevitz, Dianna Hoover, Karen Owens, Kathleen McBride, Camille Jackson, Breanne Redwing, James Ship, Nancy Rellihan, Katherine Gillespie, Melanie Moentmann, Fred Quatrocky, Mark McLaughlin, Jennifer Overholtzer, Betsy McCollum, Joseph Kenney, Mary Lamy, Leslie Riley, Kathleen Moerschel, Deanna Schulz, Dan Woods, Cynthia Lair, Lawrence Schellenberger, Michael Oltmanns, Karen Mustain, Amy Mcvay, Chad Lanning, Susan Jones, Kenneth Stwalley, Rebecca Clyma, Mary Wiese, Donna Caswell, Sarah Welch, Carrie Crowder, Dana Terry, Troy Stiff, Christopher Carter, Patrick Williams, Sandra Peoples, Lisa Cracraft, Paul Coe, Sara Fogt, Elizabeth Vannaman, Harold Wenninghoff, Chris Valverde, Andrich Parker, William Turnage, Melissa Simpkins, Lori Vander Waerdt, Alicia Costanzo, Brent Wineland, Melanie Dillon, Amy Francois, Christopher Bonjour, James Bates, William Brennecke, Michael Brandt, Gary Blanck, Chelle Adkins, Phillip Biggs, Russell Brooks, Loren Province, Kevin Garrett, Kevin Barclay, Nakima Cutchlow, Jennifer Eli, Larry Squiers, Gregg Bedell, Mary Espinoza, Roy Allen, Mary Cross, Matthew Axton, James Elliott, Janet Gamble-Duff, Ronald Reynolds, Thomas Kane, Jacqueline Jensen, Ingrid McNicholas, Timothy Lyons, Michelle O'Brien, Ruth Hughes, Shelly Schuerman, William Hancock, Cassaundra McKown, Thomas McCullough, Mark Salyer, Edward Robinson, Bernard Billesbach, Melissa Meyer, Jonathan Hinchee, Rita Hartley, Craig Schuerman, John Graves, Robert Lavalley, Stacey Goins, Darren Kinney, Reba Jackson, Francis Jones, Dennis Simmons, Jodee Horseman, Bruce Goins, William Hottel, Casey Holloway, John Oswald, Davinia Santimano, Randall Sharp, Dennis Sessler, Julie McGivern, Andrea Medina, Jennifer McCord, Daniel Meyer, Amanda Hyland, Brenda Keeton, Derron Rolf, Jill McManus-Netwal, Michael Moffitt, Patrick Lawless, Michael Gillespie, Benjamin Redwing, Phillip Klassen, Jennifer Larson, Kimberly Witt, Thomas McDonnell, Patricia Mergen, Erin Kendall, Della Graybeal, Robert Redwing, Robert Berkstresser, Joseph Filardo, Donald Woehrman, Debra Kallenberger, Kristy Hill, Jo Inzenga, Jackie Older-Hefner, Michael Giro, Patrick Nichols, Michael Sellers, Angie Manske, Heath Mustain, Brian Kemp, Jacqueline Davis, William Edwards, WIlliam Johnson, Anne Beaulieu, Randy Cook, James Laramy, Karla Floyd, Peggy Leineke, Craig Hewitt, Beverly Wessar, Diane Salinas, Robert Hutter, Christopher Ithurburn, Dustain Shaw, Thomas Edlund, Alicia Beckman, Daniel Cranmer, Sara Easterbrook, Kathleen Sarette, Elizabeth Johanson, Tom Buechel, Michael Spellman, Greg Parrish, Juree Barkley, Matt Crosson, James Ducharme, Harry Crocker, Kevin Moll, Linda Terry, Jamie Clark, Billie Geer, Cynthia Stordahl, Julie Cansler, David Operach, Michael Lovell, Denise Rojas, Dorothy Coffie, Thomas Coulter, David Walter, Richard Fortune, Robert Parrott, David Lovetere, Meri Mason, Rodney Kane, James Robinson, Ryan Magathan, Alison Magathan, Nicholas Rutkowski, Sally Schlintz, Steven Harbert, Russell Revis, Cindy Gordanier, Scott Yungeberg, Joan Horan, Yvette Santimano, Anthony Shank, Don Kleoppel, Melody Miser, Jason Hamilton, Alice Wright, Greg Brokaw, Brian Majernik, Gary Lamy, Jennifer House, John McConnell, Jeffrey Harris, Theresa Hursh, Alan Burgers, Donald Belinger, Steven Walker, Kevin Bostick, Melissa Ferguson, Tracey Alden, Jeff Carroll, Deborah Quast, Wayne Brookshire, Robert Conklin, Tina Carey, Vanessa Bross, Martha Sabin, Shelley McMullin, Brent Larson, Janet Kannard, Kole Scarbrough, Travis Schulte, Kenneth Hager, Lisa Kudrick, Charles Schell, Stefan Kolev, Juan De Los Santos, Mitchell Van Kam, Louis Connel, Douglas Stalcup, Jason Sutton, Brian Slattery, Margaret Broderick, Scott Slocum, Stephen Bay, Jennifer Bischoff, Kendra Burmaster, Donna Barbour, Matthew Dunn, Scott Alexander, Leann Garvey, John Shultz, Brent Mayberry, Lynn Sarowski, Kelly Highfill, Kristine Johnson, Brian White, Dianne Behney, Mary Triggs, Patricia Pottinger, Torri Van Kam, John Does 1-100.Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Claimant Percy Paynes Demand, #2 Exhibit B- Arbitration Agreement, #3 Exhibit C- Arbitration Agreement, #4 Exhibit D- Arbitration Agreement)(Ward, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Canfield, DST Systems, Inc., Michael L. Ferguson, Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Bonnie Kartz, Mark Mendon, Latrecia Onunkwor, David Ostermeyer, Percy Payne, Jill Pehlman, Eugene Scalia, Deborah A. Smith, Diana Weaver. (dnh)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PERCY PAYNE, DST SYSTEMS, INC., MICHAEL L. FERGUSON, MYRL C. JEFFCOAT, DEBORAH A. SMITH, ROBERT CANFIELD, BONNIE KARTZ, LATRECIA ONUNKWOR, DIANA WEAVER, DAVID OSTERMEYER, EUGENE SCALIA, United States Secretary of Labor, MARK MENDON, JILL PEHLMAN, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Addendum A)(Ward, Robert)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PERCY PAYNE, DST SYSTEMS, INC., MICHAEL L. FERGUSON, MYRL C. JEFFCOAT, DEBORAH A. SMITH, ROBERT CANFIELD, BONNIE KARTZ, LATRECIA ONUNKWOR, DIANA WEAVER, DAVID OSTERMEYER, EUGENE SCALIA, United States Secretary of Labor, MARK MENDON, JILL PEHLMAN, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Addendum A)(Richman, Ronald) Modified on 12/12/2019 (pc).
December 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert J. Ward to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the as to docket entry must reflect the name of all of the parties as to whom the summons is being requested. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to See Addendum A, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum A)(Ward, Robert) Modified on 12/12/2019 (dnh).
December 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert J. Ward to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; multiple summons requests can not be filed in a single PDF; each summons request must be filed separately or file one summons request with a rider/addendum listing all of the defendants. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
December 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Robert J. Ward. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: United States Secretary of Labor. The party was added to the case in error. (pne)
December 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert J. Ward. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc., Eugene Scalia. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (pne)
December 11, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. as possibly related to 17CV6685. (pne)
December 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PERCY PAYNE, DST SYSTEMS, INC., MICHAEL L. FERGUSON, MYRL C. JEFFCOAT, DEBORAH A. SMITH, ROBERT CANFIELD, BONNIE KARTZ, LATRECIA ONUNKWOR, DIANA WEAVER, DAVID OSTERMEYER, EUGENE SCALIA, United States Secretary of Labor, MARK MENDON, JILL PEHLMAN, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ruane Cuniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Ward, Robert) Modified on 12/11/2019 (pne).
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-06685. Document filed by Ruane Cuniff & Goldfarb, Inc..(Ward, Robert)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ward, Robert)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ruane Cuniff & Goldfarb, Inc..(Ward, Robert)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Canfield, DST Systems, Inc., Michael L. Ferguson, Myrl C. Jeffcoat, Bonnie Kartz, Mark Mendon, Latrecia Onunkwor, David Ostermeyer, Percy Payne, Jill Pehlman, Eugene Scalia, Deborah A. Smith, United States Secretary of Labor, Diana Weaver. Document filed by Ruane Cuniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ward, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc. v. Payne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Deborah A. Smith
Represented By: Alec Berin
Represented By: Heidi Ann Wendel
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Monique Olivier
Represented By: James Edward Miller
Represented By: Ronald Scott Kravitz
Represented By: Kolin C. Tang
Represented By: Nathan C. Zipperian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: DST Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Richard Clayton
Represented By: Jeffrey John Recher
Represented By: Joshua David Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Myrl C. Jeffcoat
Represented By: Alec Berin
Represented By: Heidi Ann Wendel
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Monique Olivier
Represented By: James Edward Miller
Represented By: Ronald Scott Kravitz
Represented By: Kolin C. Tang
Represented By: Nathan C. Zipperian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Robert Canfield
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Joshua B Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Latrecia Onunkwor
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Joshua B Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Bonnie Kartz
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Joshua B Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Michael L. Ferguson
Represented By: Alec Berin
Represented By: Heidi Ann Wendel
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Monique Olivier
Represented By: James Edward Miller
Represented By: Ronald Scott Kravitz
Represented By: Kolin C. Tang
Represented By: Nathan C. Zipperian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: David Ostermeyer
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Joshua B Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Jill Pehlman
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Joshua B Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Mark Mendon
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Joshua B Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: United States Secretary of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Diana Weaver
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Joshua B Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Eugene Scalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Secretary of Labor Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Isidro Mariscal
Represented By: Anna Odella Area
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruane Cuniff & Goldfarb, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruane Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Ward
Represented By: Gregory Frederick Jacob
Represented By: Natasha S. Fedder
Represented By: Frank Walter Olander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Percy Payne
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Keeton
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Moerschel
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Majernik
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Berkstresser
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Eisenberger
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Dillon
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ducharme
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harper
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelle Adkins
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Allen
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Triggs
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Wenninghoff
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Caswell
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Woods
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lamy
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Goins
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Easterbrook
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Barclay
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Vannaman
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leann Garvey
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Walker
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lovetere
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrich Parker
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Elliott
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Terry
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Stottlemyre
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefan Kolev
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer House
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gillespie
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Bolch
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Lane
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Costanzo
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Espinoza
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad McMillin
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Province
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waiyee Tsang
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Wineland
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Connell
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Edwards
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Inman
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Peoples
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Mustain
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Lanning
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci Bien-Aime
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Tuescher
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Coe
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Alvarado
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Cross
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Larson
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Coffie
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Shank
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Jones
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Meyer
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Wiese
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Billesbach
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Elliott
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Stiff
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Robinson
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ship
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McConnell
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schell
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Welch
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Bostick
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Wright
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Dunbar
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Squiers
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Inzenga
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Mcvay
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Lair
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Owens
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustain Shaw
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Jones
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juree Barkley
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royce Closterman
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Horan
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brummel
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Graves
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Fortune
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Nichols
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caryl Summers
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Johanson
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Johnson
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Schuerman
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sellers
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Harbert
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Crosson
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Ferguson
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Biggs
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brandt
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Hager
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Hinchee
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Alexander
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camille Jackson
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Terry
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Cranmer
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Wiggins
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hamilton
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Simmons
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Hyland
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Blanck
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Parrish
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Moffitt
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Giro
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Witt
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nakima Cutchlow
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kole Scarbrough
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Brokaw
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lovell
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Operach
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Murphy
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Kinney
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Sessler
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Goins
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Brennecke
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Holloway
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingrid McNicholas
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Vander Waerdt
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Alden
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Beaulieu
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Oswald
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Harris
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Clark
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcella Stoneking
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody Miser
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassaundra McKown
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Buechel
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Hill
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen McBride
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bay
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Cook
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Powell
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Stunkel
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Hughes
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Della Graybeal
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Krevitz
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Crocker
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davinia Santimano
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Simpkins
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Lyons
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Cracraft
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Bross
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamarie Williams
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hottel
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Keller
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Edlund
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Treat
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Redwing
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ithurburn
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Brown
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas McDonnell
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Kannard
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Arnold
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Schulte
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Conklin
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Rhodes
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Salyer
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Belinger
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Eli
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Burmaster
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Alexander
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Stordahl
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Crowder
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meri Mason
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keely Grayson-Inman
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tritt
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Wessar
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Poynter
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Van Kam
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Tyner
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Riley
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Williams
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Quast
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Andrews
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalaine Bowen
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Kudrick
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hancock
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Axton
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Mergen
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer McCord
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Reynolds
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Cansler
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Hursh
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Laramy
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIlliam Johnson
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Payne
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Slattery
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie McGivern
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian White
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark McLaughlin
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Hewitt
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Walter
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Mayberry
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Clower
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas McCullough
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Kallenberger
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Sarowski
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Valverde
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Coulter
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Bedell
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Redwing
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawr Schellenberger
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kane
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Slocum
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Lamy
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Klassen
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Smithmier
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Highfill
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Schlintz
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reba Jackson
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shultz
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Dunn
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Rutkowski
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle O'Brien
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Medina
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Salinas
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Rojas
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Lawless
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Carter
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breanne Redwing
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Moentmann
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sarette
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Kane
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne Behney
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodee Horseman
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torri Van Kam
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Tuescher
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Davis
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Burgers
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan De Los Santos
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Beckman
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Moll
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Clyma
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianna Hoover
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Brookshire
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ballew
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Gillespie
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Damron
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Kenney
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Sutton
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill McManus-Netwal
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Stalcup
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Francois
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derron Rolf
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Medina
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Hartley
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Leineke
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Schuerman
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Oltmanns
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Schulz
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Kleoppel
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Reik
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Ham
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Floyd
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Brooks
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Sturgeon
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanne Trimble
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Magathan
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Manske
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Kendall
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hyberger
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Broderick
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Davis
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Sabin
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tillotson
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie McMillin
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Stegeman
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley McMullin
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Garrett
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Parrott
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Stevens
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC E