Robinson, et al v. Eastman Kodak
Plaintiff: Lawrence T Heinsler, Stephen M. Ellis, Thomas L. Braden, Gordon P. Rask, Jr., Kathleen Morales, Franklin W. Jenks, Marjorie H. Thulin, Diane Nelson, Thomas D Belmont, Everett R Boyken, Brenda A Riley, Joan R Burkis, Scott D Swan, Sheila D. Crews-Noye, Rebecca A Goerke, Stephen L. Korn, Patricia A Housel, Thomas Mack, Robert J Rowles, William S. Wetmore, Sanford B Hoffman, Edward N Cecchino, James B Civitello, John D. Foy, Kim L. Calloway, Melinda D Jiacobbe, Joseph Britton, Terri J. Utter, David F. Conger, Gregory K Walker, Martha D Fernberg, Lenora Carter, Douglas A. McPherson, Scott B Keir, Mildred Boles, Sarah E Lively, Michael J Kowalczyk, Jr, Ronald A Kuehne, Ronald J. Fenner, Gail L Barrett, Patricia M. Pearce, Joanne Monds, Paul S. Kuchman, Phyllis A. Selden, Fancy S VanHoose, Albert G Pritchard, Phillip M Rosini, Civita M Bronco, Eugenio Alvarez, Bethany L Lysiak, Joseph L Liccione, Clinton Johnson, Karen M Rodak, Shawn P Corke, Sr, Carmelo Furgiuele, Sandra J Popowych, Alma W Gilman, Gerrard F Price, Eric L. Schultz, Judith Demmert, Sharon L Weins, Louis L Gray, Dona J Jackson, Daniel R Haight, Renee A Petralia, Gary S Fiske, Joseph W. Johnson, Marian E Ross, James E Richardson, David R Thomas, Terry L Ridley, Harriet R Truesdale, Leroy Kendrick, Toni M Baker, David A White, Brooksie M Hall, Robin L Farress, Frank M Provo, Peter G. Osborn, Vincent M Kurinskas, Halil Binici, Lawrence J Vanderlee, Louis W Larson, Linda J. Anderson, Michael D Maddalena, Gerard J. Ryan, Mary L Lux, Marshall Wellborn, Jr, Annie Tate, James D Gill, Kerry Vazquez, Madeline Torres, Jamie L Cuyler, Thad H Smith, John R. Cullerton, Thomas A Young, Michael R Gray, Judith F. Nasca, Edward A. Mager, James R Blake, Robert G Monnier, Cleo Butts, Jadwiga Howard, John D LeBerth, Mark W Woodruff, Carolyn Jones, Dale W Giddings, James C. Flemings, Clarence E Meyer, Mack Mahone, Jr, Francis L Corsi, Jr, Neil R Wamser, James T Butler, Paul F Bato, Samuel F Graham, Jon C Markus, Susan K Pulvino, Tenia M Bradley, Alethia M Moore, Kenneth C Wahlers, Todd L Colburn, Joe A Latimer, Jeff Williams, Jr., Ronald L Jackett, Eugene Bradley, Gerald A. Andrychuk, Dennis J. Broyld, Elaine L Zukaitis, Terrence Sugrue, Joyce M Flowers, Ippolito Cardella, James L Nelson, Jeffrey L Linza, Paul D. Omeara, Wanda Heard, Joseph P Kernaghan, Joseph P. Uttaro, Douglas E. Drake, Gail Y Wright, Joseph A Ward, J Michael Simoni, Kimble DuBoise, Gloria J Frisone, Vlade R Endulovski, Carmen C Marano, Richard R Bauer, Ray T Mann, Craig T Mollon, Hector Ayala, Gertrude T Phillips, Audry A Malcolm, John C Magioncalda, Betty A DiPonzio, John L Robinson, Jose A Escobar, Gordon J Burnam, Maggie L. Carter, Derrek Barksdale, John H Gibson, Edward G Pehta, Donald F Kuchman, Jacqueline Lomnick, Paul Dill, Thomas H Zachman, Douglas Anderson, Mark Waller, Agnes L Terrance, Julieann Perez Parrish, Judith A Lynch, John L. Davis, Pamela J. Markus, Patrick L Sabatini, Christopher A Harris, Barbara S Randolph, Kenneth W Gage, David E Klender, Karleen E. Ladue, John A Sill, Jr, Danny T Gell, Michael P. Jaskulski, Anthony L Morris, James E. Taylor, David F. Momot, Michael J McCulloch, LaVerne Harden, Carolyn Smith, Evelyn M DeMott, Cynthia A Valder, William C Minnie, Charles W. Dann, Gregory S Hart, Theotis McNair, Richard A. Sliker, Donna M Vink, Ronnie F Simmons, Richard E. Schmanke, Ray Capestany, Sheree A Colson, Richard L Fonda, Andrew M McGill, Richard F. Hasselberg, James R. Contreras, James S Knapp, Paul C. Tennity, Wilfred E Dicker, William Long, Kevin T Hurley, David R Zona, Suez E. Elmore, John E Gabel, Norman B Carter, Edna L James, Shirley P. Vergilia, Kristine D Ranieri, Thomas P Richardson, Sean A Green, Michael J Smith, Joan C Bigham, Robert Tillard, Warren F Land, Mark R. Sauer, Marlene McKinley, Gary E VanDeMortel, Thomas M Pizzo, Wayne E Morgan, Jr, Louis Divincenzo, Sonia D Vines, Elizabeth Cotton, Bette J Miller, Gary A Scudder, John D Hickey, Henry F Staab, Jr, Lubertha Lester, Vivian J Sparks, Donald D Allen, William R Speciale, Jacqueline Y Jones, James M Flanagan, Willie J. Howard, William W. Breadon, Stephanie J Vernile, Michael A. OConnell, Jr., Gerald Culhane, Tony Rivera, Mark S Kwiatkowski, Linda J Allen, Donald J. Wilson, David S. Beehner, Willie G. Harvey, Gerald R Waller, Keith M. Brugger, Dennis R Guarino, George A Clohessy, Debora A Krysinski, Fanny L Owens, Debby G. Soriano, Andrew M Nuzny, Pamela Hunter, Raffaella Colaprete, Leland C Henderson, Mary E Prescott, Robert G Webster, Jr, James D Meier, Lillian A Wright, Alex Bashta, Dennis M Halligan, Essie M Walker, Lawrence J Thrash, Emmett Lee Peters, Donald A. Hunter, Thomasf J. Mellen, Sharlene A Ackley, Jeffery W Smith, Larry J Wingate, Carol A Ludwig, Darlene R. Schuler, Debra J Nicholson, David J Dougherty, Laurence B Raymond, Mary A Baker, Linda J Arena, Maryann Riccardi, Homero Sellas, Judith A Heinlein, Nancy L. Muir, Bobby Davis, Melissa O. Green, Robert Downs, Bernard A Gause, Peter J. Redding, Gary J Ciarpelli, Jeffrey J Hagen, Keith L Hayes, George Battaglini, Aaronda Stanley, Joachim A. Kahmke, Charles Rivera, Joni D Kase, Joseph A. Lemark, Julio Mora, Mario Daloisio, Thomas M. Greggs, Randell A. Conderman, Jerrold J Platt, Richard R Sullivan, Thomas J Watson, Dorothy W Kohl, Harriet L. Tillard, Helen L. Pilittere, Albert R Smith, Royal L Avery, John A. Fabry, Richard M Spencer, Allen H Parrish, David L Montrallo, Bernice Abrahams, Christopher J Davis, Matthew P Lockhart, Donald C Markham, Jr, Diane A Nelson, Switlana Heim, Joyce Y. Newton, Nancy R Hanna, Tracy L Hale, Karen A Opel, Gerleen G Beaty, Audrey P Schell, Betty D Crews, Brian C Webster, Dennis J Barber, Michael McKay, Anjanette Johnson, Donald R Ennis, Tameka Gaskins, Betty J Thomas, Richard C Jurzysta, Karen M Raysor Wieme, Peter R. Truelson, Jr., Barbara A Drexel, Ceferino Viera, Jr, Michael Miller, Susan C. Trupo, Allen H Potter, III, Lorna M Hylton, Russell Ingam, Shaun O Coolbaugh, Randall A. Emison, Ronald F. Sauers, Michael D. Smith, Gloria D Snead, Cora L Young, Eugene R. McGlynn, Elaine D Masiuk, Dawna F Pursley, Frank T Craig, Joseph B. Coleman, Joyce A. Alexander, Ann L Bibbens, Eric Omark, Melvin M Smithers, Patrick Dilella, Michael Rathke, Blanche Nix, Sommyr D Pochan, Todd M Wyant, Juan A. Moore, John L. Shone, Steven J Kenny, Charles W Sanford, Jeffrey A Barber, Michael P Dougherty, Joseph C Szembrot, Frederick J Strauss, Eugene R. Englert, David M Baldwin, Carol H Hickey, William E Fierstein, Carter L. Brown, Stan Chmiel, Gerald W Stowe, Joy B. Rodas, Huey Mcray, Jr., James S Bromley, Douglas J Thiel, Michael A Fedor, Ella M. Prior, Frederik F Dame, Kenneth F Pawlaczyk, Kenneth L Baker, Christine P Paris, Roy D Snell, Martha M Moses, David C Gorton, Stephen R. Stott, David R Appleton, David M Brown, Eric M Morrison, Klaus D. Henkes, William R Laidlaw, Mark E. Coleman, Mark E. Kowalski, Fogarty S Joseph, Derek J. Easterling, Keisha C White, Jewel D Crisler, Bernard Robinson, Raphael S Riche, Gwendolyn M Dance, Theresa L Wentworth, Abasi A Kitt, Milton E Little, Aisha K. Andrews, Jay Hiscock, Kathryn A Bowen, Stephen L Tipton, Ronald J Smithski, Merton D Joyles, Henry L. Turner, Moses Kelly, Theodore R. Boccuzzi, Thema S LeFlore, Robert P Dank, Norma S Phillips, Joseph Accapezzato, James R Gerhardt, Ralph M Gardiner, Michelle A. Camp, Kathleen M DeMarco, Linda P Madigan, Terry L Scroger, Cornelia L Washington, Eric M. Dukes, Gertrude Kinard, Leo H Rhodes, Jr, Melvin L. Moyd, John F Fleig, Ro Vitale, Brian L. Vogler, Tammy C. Thomas, Nancy J Wilson, Kurt M Reinhardt, Vera L Libbett, Karen Paul, Kimberly M. Watkins, Gary E Hettler, Linda M. Biehler, Nicole A. Stallworth, Paul S. Specksgoor, Michael L. Bailey, James J Robinson, Deborah A Clark, Lee C Ellison, Robert L Cunningham, Richard G. Hoffman, James E Snell, Eugene I Kunzer, Howard Goldstone, Robert L Carter, Sr, Susan Kartes, James C. Saulter, Benjamin Wilburn, Sr, Donald W. Alford, Kenneth J Harris, Jr, Alana Jones, Lila O. Bethmann, James L. Vincent, David A Stasko, Kevan A Richardson, Barbara J. Crocitti, David E. Fox, Christopher Carroll, Earnest J Tiller, Philip V. Conrad, Paul R Bellis, Recia M Wright, Norma L Anderson, Robert Montgomery, Judith A Cutaia, Laura A. Chamberlain, Robert F Lyaski, Richard A Marrapese, Lynn M Airel, Patricia J Edwards, Harold J. Lindley, James Todd, Alan A Alwardt, James J Hassler, Timothy W. Arnold, John D Clark, William A Boone, James P Baybutt, Alfred Burno, Franklin D Harvey, Michael A Robinson, Robert J Earley, Robert J Nau, Thomas J Eisenhauer, Gilda C. Wooten, William E Dyke, Eleanor Ann Madden, Linda J VerStreate, Louis J Englert, Barbara A Uloth, David A Lewis, Clarence E Meyer, Jr, Billie J Brice, David C. Ferrara, Harry L. Moses, Janet M Realbuto, Sylvester Thomas, Kathy Thomas-Finch, Richard E Morgan, James L Lawhorn, Samuel Fason and William Anderson
Special Master: Esq. Steven V Modica
Case Number: 6:2002cv06204
Filed: April 11, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2010 Filing 338 Sealed Document (manual filing). (JHF)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 337 STIPULATION AND ORDER Closing Settlement Administration. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on October 21, 2010. (MS)
October 21, 2009 Filing 336 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael A. Telesca: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2009 re #332 MOTION to Certify Class and Approve Settlement filed by Bruno Dambrauskas. Motion granted. Order and Judgment to be filed. Counsel for all parties appeared. (Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (MS)
October 21, 2009 Filing 335 Final Judgment and ORDER Approving Class Action Settlement Agreement and Release. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on October 21, 2009.(Herrero-Jaarsma, Maria)
October 20, 2009 Filing 334 AFFIRMATION re #332 MOTION to Certify Class and Approve Settlement filed by Eastman Kodak Company. (Jones, Stephen)
October 19, 2009 Filing 333 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bruno Dambrauskas. Amendment to #332 MOTION to Certify Class and Approve Settlement Memorandum Table of Contents Corrected. (Rogers, Charles)
October 19, 2009 Filing 332 MOTION to Certify Class and Approve Settlement by Bruno Dambrauskas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mark Hannabury In Support, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Rogers, Charles)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting #329 Motion for an Order re Class Action, Settlement, Proposed Form, Schedule for Opt-Outs and Scheduling Fairness Hearing. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 8/21/09. (JHF)
August 21, 2009 Filing 330 AFFIRMATION in Support re #329 MOTION for an Order re Class Action, Settlement, Proposed Form, Schedule for Opt-Outs and Scheduling Fairness Hearing, filed by Eastman Kodak Company. (JHF)
August 21, 2009 Filing 329 MOTION for an Order re Class Action, Settlement, Proposed Form, Schedule for Opt-Outs and Scheduling Fairness Hearing by all plaintiffs.(JHF)
August 21, 2009 Filing 328 AFFIDAVIT by Special Master Steven V Modica. (JHF)
September 5, 2007 Filing 327 Final Stipulation and ORDER Closing Administration of the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on September 5, 2007.(Herrero-Jaarsma, Maria)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Stipulation and ORDER Extending Claims Deadline and Establishing Final Claims Deadline. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on July 17, 2007.(Herrero-Jaarsma, Maria)
March 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting payment of fees to the Class Action Administrator. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on March 27, 2007.(Herrero-Jaarsma, Maria)
November 17, 2006 Filing 324 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL of Class Action Settlement Agreement and Release. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 11/17/06. (JHF)
October 26, 2006 Filing 323 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Fairness Hearing) held on October 25, 2006 before Judge Michael A. Telesca. Court Reporter: Karen J. Winter. 6 pages. (SMO, )
October 25, 2006 Filing 322 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Telesca : Motion Hearing held on 10/25/2006 re #318 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by William Robinson,. No objections to settlement. Counsel to submit order. Appearances: M. Hannabury, C. Rogers, T. Shinaman, S. Piper. (Court Reporter KW.) (MS, )
October 25, 2006 Filing 321 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT to #320 Amended AFFIDAVIT by William Robinson.(Rogers, Charles) Docket Text Modified on 10/26/2006. (JHF)
October 24, 2006 Filing 320 Amended AFFIDAVIT of Mark Hannabury in Support of #318 MOTION by William Robinson.(Rogers, Charles) Docket Text Modified on 10/25/2006. (JHF)
October 20, 2006 Filing 319 AFFIDAVIT In Support of Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement by Eastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: #1)(Shinaman, Todd)
October 17, 2006 Filing 318 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by William Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support #2 Affidavit #3 Exhibit)(Rogers, Charles)
October 17, 2006 NOTICE: Set/Reset Deadlines as to #318 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2006 10:00 AM before Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Please note TIME CHANGE from 9:00 AM to 10:00 AM. (MS, )
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 317 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Time to File Motion. Plaintiff's motion to approve settlement due by 10/16/2006. Defendant's response due by 10/20/2006. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 10/12/06. (JHF)
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 316 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Putative Subclass A(2). Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 10/13/06. (JHF)
October 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER Directing Payment of Special Master Fees. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on October 10, 2006. (Herrero-Jaarsma, Maria)
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 314 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Notices mailed by 9/1/06. Claim forms and objections submitted by 10/11/06. Motion to approve settlement due by 10/13/2006. Response due by 10/20/2006. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 8/7/06. (JHF)
July 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Appointing Special Master. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on July 26, 2006. (Herrero-Jaarsma, Maria)
July 17, 2006 Filing 312 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Telesca : Pretrial Conference held on 7/17/2006. Counsel for all parties appeared. (MS, )
July 10, 2006 Filing 311 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Telesca : Status Conference held on 7/10/2006. Counsel for all parties appeared. (MS, )
June 27, 2006 NOTICE: Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/10/2006 09:00 AM before Hon. Michael A. Telesca. (MS, )
May 2, 2006 Filing 310 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Telesca : Telephone Conference held on 5/2/2006. Counsel for all parties appeared. (MS, )
January 12, 2006 Filing 309 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Telesca : Status Conference held on 1/12/2006. Counsel for all parties appeared. (MS, )
December 22, 2005 Filing 308 REVISED SETTLEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER (Subclass A): Settlement Conference set for 1/12/2006 10:00 AM before Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Plaintiff settlement proposal submitted by 12/1/05. Defendant Response due by 1/11/2006. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 12/21/05. (JHF)
December 13, 2005 NOTICE: Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/9/2006 10:00 AM before Hon. Michael A. Telesca. (MS, )
May 11, 2005 Filing 307 STIPULATION AND SETTLEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, On or before 12/1/05 the plaintiffs shall submit to Kodak a settlement proposal, Kodak shall Respond by 12/21/2005. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 5/11/05. (TO, )
April 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 306 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: classification of EKC technologists, EKC in the State of NY are tolled from 3/14/05 until the earlier of... (see order). Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 4/7/05. (TO, )
February 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 305 STIPULATION AND ORDER of confidentiality. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 1/28/05. (TO, )
June 7, 2004 Filing 304 AFFIDAVIT by William Robinson. (Rogers, Charles)
June 1, 2004 Filing 303 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by William Robinson. (Rogers, Charles)
May 20, 2004 Filing 302 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of James Williams Jr, Michael J Kowalczyk Jr, Dale S Ryerse, Roberta Session, Donald R Pifer. (Rogers, Charles)
May 20, 2004 Filing 301 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of James Williams Jr, Dale S Ryerse. (Rogers, Charles)
May 20, 2004 Filing 300 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Richard Rummings. (Rogers, Charles)
May 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 299 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the time for the filing of the affidavit by Class Counsel of the list of Class members from 5/22/04 to 6/7/04. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 05/18/04. (Countryman, J.)
May 12, 2004 Filing 298 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Steven F Richardson, Gloria D Snead, David A Wride, Thomas M Pizzo, Melinda D Jiacobbe, David L Spalty, Christine G Cornell, Rory C Raymond, David J McElhenny, Joe A Latimer, Charles E Fontaine, Dennis R Hough, Barbara A White, Lynne Levandowski, Harold Kaza, Mark G Allen, Brenda J Crosby, Sharell Bowens, Betty J Thomas, Larry A Harter, Christopher C Hansen, Raymond L Wallner, Susan K Pulvino, Jeffery W Smith, Gaetano Auriuso, Kathryn R Ranieri, Nicole R Wilson, Phyllis Wilson, Samuel Fason, Thomas W Smith, Bobby Davis, Lynn M Olear, Kenneth D Lockett, Charles Hare, Christine Clay, Wilfred E Dicker, Moses Kelly. (Rogers, Charles)
May 12, 2004 Filing 297 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Gloria D Snead, Thomas M Pizzo, Melinda D Jiacobbe, David L Spalty, Ellen E Smith, Lisa A Partee, Rory C Raymond, Lynden E Gordon, Lawrence Cali, Dennis R Hough, Thomas Todd, Barbara A White, Joyce M Glover, Lynne Levandowski, Harold Kaza, Sharell Bowens, Betty J Thomas, Rose L Lew, Betty A DiPonzio, Scott C LaRocca, Raymond L Wallner, Susan K Pulvino, Jeffrey W Smith, Gaetano Auriuso, Richard Senator, Dawn M Goetze, Kathryn R Ranieri, Bruno Dambrauskas, Samuel Fason, Thomas W Smith, Bobby Davis, Kenneth D Lockett, Charles Hare, Doris A Cowell, Christine Clay, Wilfred E Dicker, Moses Kelly. (Rogers, Charles)
May 11, 2004 Filing 296 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Rodney Bryant, Lori E Connolly, Paul J Sumski, Larry D Cooper, Alexander Dodson, Suzanne M Dodson, Gary S Crawford, John Pilskalns, Melvin C Johnson, John D Hickey, Debora A Krysinski, June L Ballard, Rhonda G Beck, Donna M Nicholson, Barbara S Randolph, Tara D Dent, Jeffrey A Barber, William Long, Thomas M Such, Ronald E Gavigan, Daniel L Shade Jr, Walter Roland, Thomas B Lester. (Rogers, Charles)
May 11, 2004 Filing 295 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Asilee B Chess, Robert J Appleton, Eugene I Kunzer, Gail M Appleton, Rhoda A Williams, Nora C Kroll, John E Gradwick, John T Leiston, Brenda J Joseph, Richard A Tojek, Larue M Young, Philip A VanDerMeid, Lynn A Ferris, Marilyn B Cashe, Lawrence T Heinsler, David G Johnson, Carmelo Furgiuele, William Wegman, Gary T Rosenberg, Roy E Nelson, Enrico J Baldoni, Bruce E Phillips, Kenneth R McFadden. (Rogers, Charles)
May 10, 2004 Filing 294 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Fernando L Gonzalez, Donald W Seeley, Lori E Connolly, Paul J Sumski, Alexander Dodson, Gary S Crawford, John D Hickey, Roosevelt A Murray Sr, Debora A Krysinski, Lance R Baker, Thomas M Such, Thomas P Stefanucci, Walter Roland, Shirley B Wilson, Asilee B Chess, Do'Ries Roberts, Robert J Appleton, Rose Jenkins, Gail M Appleton, Daniel L Shade Jr, Margaret J Lipton, Richard H Beck, June L Ballard, Donna M Vink, Tara D Dent, Jeffrey A Barber, Barbara S Randolph, Melvin C Johnson, Linda A Albright. (Rogers, Charles)
May 10, 2004 Filing 293 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Nora C Kroll, Eartha L Danner, Gail L Barrett, Lawrence T Heinsler, Marilyn B Cashe, Joyce M Flowers, Carmelo Furgiuele, Gary T Rosenberg, Kevin Peters, Barbara A Pittman, John E Gradwick, John T Leiston, Jonathan A Kerner, Brenda J Joseph, Richard A Tojek, Roy E Nelson, Stanley R Tarwacki, Enrico J Baldoni, Eric B Truby, Ellen M Metherell, Michael J McCulloch, Bruce E Phillips, Debra M Peris, Diane Waters, Derrek Barksdale, Richard B Hampton. (Rogers, Charles)
May 10, 2004 Filing 292 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Sharon D Patmon, Donald W LaClair, Michael J Mannara, Gerald M Daniels, Bessie Smith, Richard Barley, David C Gorton. (Rogers, Charles)
May 10, 2004 Filing 291 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Patricia A Housel, Linda A Allen, Michael R Gray, William J Williams, Richard Barley, David C Gorton. (Rogers, Charles)
May 10, 2004 Filing 290 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Jeanine Logan, LeVern Burrows, Carolyn Smith, Gracie L Jackson, Norma L Anderson, Lawrence Cown, John J Noakes, David A Lewis, Robert H D'Mont, Judy A Klauck, Warren C Kosel, Robert A DiVita, Franklin W Jenks, Johnny Sibley Jr, Priscilla A Smith, Leoper Smith, David J Moultrie, Clade B Ashlock, Nancy Moultrie, Thomas Ciavarri, Angela D Larkin, Lucille C Aduwa-Ero, Rocco J Ventura, Sandra L Tombari, Carolle Berrouet, Allen H Parrish, Keith F LeFlore, Lorenzo Rambo, William C Pellett, Jacqueline M Kelly, Phillip M Rosini. (Rogers, Charles)
May 10, 2004 Filing 289 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Jeanine Logan, LeVern Burrows, Norma L Anderson, Gracie L Jackson, John J Noakes, Raymond P Krais, Brenda A Riley, David A Lewis, Robert H D'Mont, Keisha C White, Raymond J Wolfe, Jason L Kimmel, Alana Jones, Judy A Klauck, Warren Kosel, Robert A DiVita, Franklin W Jenks, Johnny Sibley Jr, Leoper Smith, Priscilla A Smith, Nancy Moultrie, Thomas Ciavarri, Roger P Wing, Angela D Larkin, Rocco J Ventura, Judith Clark, LaVerne Harden, Sandra L Tombari, Carolle Berrouet, Allen H Parrish, Lorenzo Rambo, William C Pellett, Jacqueline M Kelly, Robert E Perkins, Marilyn A Sibley. (Rogers, Charles)
May 10, 2004 Filing 288 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Richard R Bauer, Stephen D Rowley, Floyd D Madison, Mark D Farrell, Thomas Mack, Edwin Bower, Ja'Net R Scott Barron, Thomas J Burge, Michael G Albanese, Michael J Smith, Norman B Munger, Gloria J Frisone, Stephen L Tipton, Daniel M Cramer, Mark S Voellinger, James D Taffner, George A Wikander, Janet M Realbuto, Timothy L Hood, Patrick J Conroy, Martin H Staub, Anthony Bianchi, Marcella F VanGilder, Dorothy U Andrews, Norma S Phillips, Wilmer L Sutton. (Rogers, Charles)
May 10, 2004 Filing 287 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Roy D Snell, Richard R Bauer, Stephen D Rowley, Jacqueline S Shepherd, Floyd D Madison, Grace Williams, Mark D Farrell, Thomas Mack, Ja'Net R Scott Barron, Thomas J Burge, Michael G Albanese, Michael J Smith, Mark S Voellinger, Norman B Munger, Gloria J Frisone, Stephen L Tipton, James D Taffner, George A Wikander, Janet M Realbuto, Timothy L Hood, Cynthia A Valder, Elaine J Bakewicz, Sergio Andino, Ronald E Kwasneski, Andrea L Seale, Anthony Bianchi, Dorothy U Andrews, Norma S Phillips. (Rogers, Charles)
May 10, 2004 Filing 286 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of S M Lester, Mary A Wagner, Lloyd D Winans, David C Gaudioso, Valerie J Vermeulen, James S Knapp, Lisa M Ciciarelli, George A Clohessy, Charles E Burke, Joann Harter, Greg J Madison, Robert N Crandell, Norman Honan, Michael McKay, David R Davis, Janice A Pitcher, Karen L Barton, Donald J Baliu, George Devoe Jr, Roberto Hozman, Raymond L Jones, Andrew M McGill, Louis F Corona Jr, Louis T Brown, James L Boyce, Arnold W Jacob, Lawrence J Vanderlee, Fancy S VanHoose, Carolyn R Gray, Sandra D Bullock, Virginia A Schroeder, Jack D Townsend. (Rogers, Charles)
May 10, 2004 Filing 285 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of S M Lester, Everett Jubenville, Mary A Wagner, Lisa M Ciciarelli, Lloyd D Winans, David C Gaudioso, Ralph W Neal, Valerie J Vermeulen, James S Knapp, George A Clohessy, Joann Harter, Greg J Madison, Peter C Maves, Nicholas J Spina, Charles E Burke, Robert N Crandell, Suzanne M Schmidt, Norman Honan, Michael McKay, David R Davis, Janice A Pitcher, Desmond D Moultrie, Gevonia A Allen, Karen L Barton, Teresa Zazzara, Raymond L Jones, Andrew M McGill, Marco Arroyo, Nancy T Weiland, George Devoe Jr, Angel R Maldonado, Louis F Corona Jr, Arnold W Jacob, Vincent Zegarelli, Fancy S VanHoose, Carolyn R Gray, Sandra D Bullock, Willie W Harrison. (Rogers, Charles)
May 10, 2004 Filing 284 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Robert Tillard, Earnest J Tiller, George Roth, Michael J Wrazen, Martha A McCutchen, Anthony J Ciciarelli, James T Butler, Joseph Elia, James D Hunter, Wilfredo Maneiro, Albert R Smith, Peter J Klees, Donna M Martin, Aloysius A Kerezman, Linda J Arena, Kelly L Jubenville, Royal L Avery, Argie M Davis, Joseph Britton, Cristal L Williams, Ronald Vallot, Lynn M Airel, Halil Binici, Richard Popowych, Owen C Mellon, Sandra J Popowych, Santina M Adams, Robert J Brogan, Paul Rossi, Samuel T Meleca, Vincent Guerrieri, Anthony M Scarbinsky, Delores Scott. (Rogers, Charles)
May 7, 2004 Filing 283 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Lewis L Lewis, Robert Tillard, Michael J Furia, Earnest J Tiller, George Roth, Michael J Wrazen, Martha A McCutchen, Anthony J Ciciarelli, Joseph Elia, James D Hunter, Christopher N Burgess, Wilfredo Maneiro, Albert R Smith, Susan Burgholzer, John L Robinson, Peter J Klees, Royal L Avery, Argie M Davis, Joseph Britton, Cristal L Williams, Aloysius A Kerezman, John A Merola, Lynn M Airel, Halil Binici, Sandra J Popowych, Robert J Brogan, Donna J Cross-Gundrum, Santina M Adams, Delores Scott, Paul Rossi, Samuel T Meleca, Vincent Guerrieri, Kevin R Wagar. (Rogers, Charles)
May 7, 2004 Filing 282 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Barbara J McGowan, Thomas C Facteau, Elizabeth Veign, John Veign, Karen M Rodak, Billy M Slater, Irene Milot, Dennis Sullivan, Sharon E Curley, Robert Downs, Kenneth S Bumpus, Christopher J Davis, Robert J Earley, Connie L Lamar, Steven J Kenny, Roybale Anderson, Joseph Hayes, Bertrand K Hartwick, Lori A D'Amico, Anthony Palucci, Deborah Felton, Furman Brown, Ivory Lanos, Elaine Mounnarat, William H Hartwig III, Donna R Owens, Daniel F Cooper, Gary M Noblett, Dennis J Barber, Cornelia Washington, Kenneth C Wahlers, David E Hayes, Sandra L Ouelette, Susan L Musson. (Rogers, Charles)
May 7, 2004 Filing 281 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Joni D Kase, Thomas C Facteau, Kenneth Wright, Elizabeth Veign, John Veign, Patricia Buie, Karen M Rodak, Kelly L Jubenville, Dennis Sullivan, Sharon E Curley, Daniel Bischoping, Robert Downs, Kenneth S Bumpus, Christopher J Davis, Judith Demmert, Graydon C Sauls, Irene Milot, Kenneth D Preston, Connie L Lamar, Robert J Earley, Jadwiga Howard, Steven J Kenny, Roybale Anderson, Richard D Windhauser, Joseph Hayes, Bertrand K Hartwick, Carol A Mack, Deborah Felton, Lori A D'Amico, Furman Brown, Ivory Lanos, Kathy P McCombs, George V Elias, Elaine Mounnarat, Gary M Noblett, William H Hartwig III, Donna R Owens, Daniel F Cooper, Dennis J Barber, Kenneth C Wahlers, Cornelia L Washington, David E Hayes, Michael J Bentley, Sandra L Ouelette, Susan L Musson, Dennis M Halligan. (Rogers, Charles)
May 7, 2004 Filing 280 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Robert E Chatterson, James R Louk, Herman D Schwingle, Nellie M Williams, Kerry Vazquez, Frederik F Dame, Ann L Bibbens, Annie Tate, Wendy L Kenny, Pamela S VanLare, Randall D Barber, Jesse Hunter, Bernice Abrahams, Geraldine O Reaves, Edward G Pehta, Norma L Soles, Gordon D Young, Richard S Hudack, Wayne E Morgan Jr, Joseph Arena, Richard Amico, Laverne Waldron, Walter T Nixon. (Rogers, Charles)
May 7, 2004 Filing 279 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Michael Ferreri, Bessie Smith, Nellie M Williams, Tommy Vazquez, Kerry Vazquez, Frederik F Dame, Jeraline B Hawkins, Kaley Lochner, Annie Tate, James Todd, Brian C Webster, Wendy L Kenny, Pamela S VanLare, Randall D Barber, Carolyn Jones, Jesse Hunter, Bernice Abrahams, Geraldine O Reaves, Edward G Pehta, Elwood C Jordan Jr, Richard S Hudack, Norma L Soles, Freddie L Clark, Gordon D Young, Wayne E Morgan Jr, Joseph Arena, Richard Amico, Laverne Waldron, Stephen G Dowe. (Rogers, Charles)
May 6, 2004 Filing 278 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of William L Tillman, Mark Sittler, Robert J Murray, Patrick L Sabatini, Ruth F Wilson, James G Streb, James F Burton, Bret A Oliphant, Janice M Alderson, Queenie Allison, Elaine G Deane, Zenaida Asis, Dominic Mariani, Thomas P Boyer, Tony C Gardner. (Rogers, Charles)
May 6, 2004 Filing 277 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Mark Sittler, Robert J Murray, Lubertha Lester, Patrick L Sabatini, Ruth F Wilson, Bret A Oliphant, Janice M Alderson, Queenie Allison, Elaine G Deane, Dominic Mariani, Elaine D'Ettorre, Thomas P Boyer, Tony C Gardner. (Rogers, Charles)
May 5, 2004 Filing 276 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Mark D Shepherd, Frank Wandtke, John T McCormick, Mary C Taylor, Rosa M Peace-Long, Thomas G Bailey, Peter W Goodman, Sandra L Swadling, Frank A Viggiani, Joseph S Hryb, Donald J Reinhardt, Robert J Mooney, Gail Y Wright, Kenneth A Heidorn, Dieuseul Alexandre, David A Schultz, Elaine D'Ettorre. (Rogers, Charles)
May 5, 2004 Filing 275 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Mark D Shepherd, Frank Wandtke, Michael A Gala, John T McCormick, Mary C Taylor, Laurie A Testa, Rosa M Peace-Long, Thomas G Bailey, Peter W Goodman, Christopher Carroll, David A Stasko, Frank A Viggiani, Joseph S Hryb, Donald J Reinhardt, Robert J Nau, Gail Y Wright, Kenneth A Heidorn, Dieuseul Alexandre, David A Schultz, Charles C Stanton, Nicole Deutsch, Kathryn A Bowen. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 274 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Richard E Morgan, Frederick J Strauss, Houston C Daniels, Michael Beaty, Richard A Marrapese, Roy L Nichols, Allan Wicker, Benjamin Oakes, Carol H Hickey, Gail V Clune, Mark S Fessette, Marshall Wellborn Jr, William B Wade II, Civita M Bronco, James C Domnissey, Susan A Tillman, Charmian L Sercu, Jennifer S Gibson, Juanita Nelson, Rebecca A Goerke, Robert R Rotach, Craig T Mollon, Roger A Amyot. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 273 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Kimble DuBoise, Richard E Morgan, Frederick J Strauss, Houston C Daniels, Richard A Marrapese, Michael Beaty, Roy L Nichols, Allan Wicker, Benjamin Oakes, Sandra H Tuschong, Robert J VanNorman Jr, Carol H Hickey, John J Dole, Linda D Dole, Gail V Clune, Mark S Fessette, Steven Graumann, Juanita Nelson, William B Wade II, James P VanDorpe, Susan A Tillman, Jennifer S Gibson, Thema S LeFlore, Rebecca A Goerke, Craig T Mollon, Laurie K Hackett, Janice D Sutton Barton. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 272 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Salvatore P Marasco Jr, June M Oakes, George H Fitzgerald Jr, Patricia M Crenshaw, Martin E Barry, Patricia J Edwards, Kevin R Hartleben, Sharon L Jonasse, Louis J Englert, Nancy T Spetts, Joann Simmons. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 271 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Salvatore P Marasco Jr, Willie Stewart, Patricia M Crenshaw, Donald M Deiure, Brooks A Ibbetson, Martin E Barry, June M Oakes, Michele M DuBreck, Ruth A Doupe, David W Rawlins, Kevin R Hartleben, Sharon L Jonasse, Nancy T Spetts, Joann Simmons, Louis J Englert, Thomas M Buschang. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 270 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Alice M Hoyt, Robert Montgomery. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 269 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Andrew Mazzucco, Jamonica L Deramus, Stephanie L LoBrutto, Robert L Owen, James N Painting. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 268 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of John T Vay, John W Johnson, Namon Rump, Susan J McKinney, Joseph P Kernaghan, Dawna F Pursley. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 267 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Dianne D Delahanty, John T Vay, John W Johnson, Henrietta H Tyndell, Joseph P Kernaghan, Dawna F Pursley. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 266 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Thomas E Grove, Jerome L Wilson, Sandra Burch, Ronda L Tozier, George E Steffler Jr, Robert A Lucia, Toni M Baker, Barry A Johnson. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 265 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Thomas E Grove, Sondra D Wilson, Jerome L Wilson, Nicholas R Gerringer, Sandra Burch, Ronda L Tozier, Mazie T Williams-Lowery, George E Steffler Jr, Robert A Lucia, Toni M Baker, Switlana Heim. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 264 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Edward E Snider, Gladys Jordan, Ricky Marshall, Clifford J Provost III, Shirley A Main, Thomas B Roesler, George H Brooks. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 263 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Ricky Marshall, L C Barnes, April D Marshall, Shirley A Main, Thomas B Roesler, James V Meyers, George H Brooks. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 262 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of John Anderson, Brian C Magar, Richard A Vermeulen, Milton Reaves Jr, Eileen L Bilak, Richard A Parisi, Carol A Ludwig, Kenneth J Brenner, Gary R McLean, Darryl D Worthy, William R Beck, Eugene Bradley, Ronald J Mykins, Robert L Follett, John C Magioncalda. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 261 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of John Anderson, Brian C Magar, William E Fierstein, Richard A Vermeulen, Eileen L Bilak, Shawna R Davis, James V Kurinskas, Eugene F Neal, Carol A Ludwig, Gary R McLean, Darryl D Worthy, William R Beck, Eugene Bradley, Ronald J Mykins, Robert L Follett, John C Magioncalda. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 260 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of John J Yannello, Karen L Wright, James L Hendricks, Richard H Kishita, Aaron Jackson, Dolores M Hooper, Jacqueline Lomnick, Jack H Bartlett, Katherine M Heger. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 259 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Gerald S Dias, John J Yannello, Karen L Wright, James L Hendricks, Richard H Kishita, Mack Mahone Jr, Aaron Jackson, Kenneth N Byron, Dolores M Hooper, Manuel Quinones, Jacqueline Lomnick, David J Dougherty, Jack H Bartlett, Katherine M Heger. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 258 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Michael Jackson. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 257 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Carl Camille Jr, Harry E Deissinger, Dale J Abrams. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 256 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Carl Camille Jr, John W Raycroft, Kenneth R McFadden, Dale J Abrams. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 255 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of James E Scheib, Steven M Ressue, John M Frech, Albert W Webber Jr, Thomas A Stevens. (Rogers, Charles)
May 4, 2004 Filing 254 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Bernard J Saulsbury, Steven M Ressue, Carolyn H French, Amy L Gildemeyer, Ricky L Shepard, John M Frech, Thomas A Stevens, John Muldrow. (Rogers, Charles)
April 22, 2004 Filing 253 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Gary K Burchill, Patrick W Cocchiara, Cleveland Brown, Mary W Murray, Sharon A Petralis, David P Sallade, Erwin Nordhausen, Joseph T Battaglia, Jean C Desardouin, Joseph C Szembrot, Leonard Bakewicz, Donald J Duffy, Vincent A Golino. (Rogers, Charles)
April 22, 2004 Filing 252 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Donald J Heger, Gary K Burchill, Catherine Mobley, Carlos L Urriola, Joyce M Linehan, Mary W Murray, Sharon A Petralis, Keith Boyce, Cleveland Brown, Todd R Reed, Jean C Desardouin, Patrick W Cocchiara, Glenn Gilmore, Leonard Bakewicz, Donald J Duffy, Vincent A Golino. (Rogers, Charles)
April 22, 2004 Filing 251 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Thad H Smith. (Rogers, Charles)
April 22, 2004 Filing 250 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Denise Langley, Katrina C Armstrong, Thad H Smith, Gary A Brongo, Milton E Little. (Rogers, Charles)
April 22, 2004 Filing 249 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Margaret Donatella, Gary F Marotz, Donald F Kuchman, Elaine L Zukaitis, Robert K Owens, Olga G Bourtis, Juanita R Wilburn, Brooksie M Hall. (Rogers, Charles)
April 22, 2004 Filing 248 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Benjamin Wilburn Sr, Joseph R Perham, Brooksie M Hall, Olga G Bourtis, Juanita R Wilburn, Porfirio V Mercado Jr, Robert K Owens, Wilmer L Sutton, William A Hawkins, Elaine L Zukaitis, Donald F Kuchman, James R O'Reilly, Terry L Scroger. (Rogers, Charles)
April 19, 2004 Filing 247 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of John A Coco, Lillian A Wright, Donna M Rossi, Barbara A Fox, Francis L DiTotto. (Rogers, Charles)
April 19, 2004 Filing 246 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of John A Coco, Lillian A Wright, Gloria J Robinson, Steven A Little, Kevin G Rogers, Michael P Dougherty, Pamela J Breeze, Lucille G Morris. (Rogers, Charles)
April 19, 2004 Filing 245 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Sonia D Vines, Larry R Lammes, Janet Nicodemus, Manuel E Espinosa, Thomas H Zachman, Rebecca Lyman, Terrence Sugrue, Duane R Hamer, Louis L Gray, William A Licherdell, Jimmy L Barley. (Rogers, Charles)
April 19, 2004 Filing 244 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Sonia D Vines, William A Licherdell, Louis L Gray, Larry R Lammes, Mary Jean Johnson, Manuel E Espinosa, Thomas H Zachman, Rebecca Lyman, Ronnie Mann, Robert A Broda, Jimmy L Barley, Janet R Kobos. (Rogers, Charles)
April 19, 2004 Filing 243 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Porfirio V Mercado Jr, Shirley A McCullough, Steven C Lamphron, Richard J Sullivan II, Inez Bennett, Bernard Robinson, Thomas P Richardson, William R Speciale, Timothy J Harrigan, Judy R Wescott, Lucien L Campbell. (Rogers, Charles)
April 19, 2004 Filing 242 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Joan C Dixon, Shirley A McCullough, Steven C Lamphron, Richard J Sullivan II, Bernard Robinson, Thomas P Richardson, Louise G Scott, Deborah A Clark, Rennie F Bloom, William R Speciale. (Rogers, Charles)
April 14, 2004 Filing 241 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Albert A Masiello, Norman P Honan, Darinka Stojanova, David L Montrallo, Richard D Tompkins, Alan J Burnham. (Rogers, Charles)
April 14, 2004 Filing 240 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Albert A Masiello, Norman P Honan, Darinka Stojanova, Janice S Hamilton, David L Montrallo, Charles Rivera, Richard D Tompkins, Irene G Anderson, Isaac Sanders, Eugene R Miller. (Rogers, Charles)
April 14, 2004 Filing 239 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Anthony Aleo, Nancy R Hanna, Kenneth L Baker, John P Dobrowsky, Gerald R Waller, Christine P Paris, Robert S Beavers, Todd L Colburn. (Rogers, Charles)
April 14, 2004 Filing 238 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Anthony Aleo, Marvin L Thompson, Ray T Mann, James C McCoy, Christine P Paris, Robert S Beavers, Martin C Straub, Bethany L Lysiak, Sommyr D Pochan. (Rogers, Charles)
April 14, 2004 Filing 237 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Robin M Dalle, Paul G Tisdell, Sandra R Caruso, Craig Morrison, Debra J Nicholson, Anjanette Johnson, Cleo Butts. (Rogers, Charles)
April 14, 2004 Filing 236 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Elizabeth R McNally, Alex Bashta, Robin M Dalle, Jason Miglioratti, Sandra R Caruso, Debra J Nicholson, Anjanette Johnson. (Rogers, Charles)
April 12, 2004 Filing 235 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Alan A Alwardt, J Michael Simoni, Gordon A Wright, James K Neufeglise, Timothy A Mee, Mike S Salter, Sharon L Weins, Ronald L Mason. (Rogers, Charles)
April 12, 2004 Filing 234 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Gerald Culhane, Tony Rivera, Timothy A Mee, Alan A Alwardt, Bonnie J Bronold, Richard E Lucchesi, Michael A Fedor, J Michael Simoni, Gordon A Wright, Deborah S Wishard, James K Neufeglise, Sharon L Weins, Ronald L Mason, Deborah H Souder, Michael A Robinson, Rose P Wilson, Bette J Miller, Richard P Dewey. (Rogers, Charles)
April 12, 2004 Filing 233 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Jill B Kettleson, Concetta Mastroberardino, Sharlene A Ackley, Frank M Provo, Ida Miller, Vera L Libbett, Kathryn H Keenan, Mario Daloisio, Daniel A Milbrandt, Ronald W Buckert, Royal L Avery, James J Reisinger, Sherman Simpson. (Rogers, Charles)
April 12, 2004 Filing 232 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Concetta Mastroberardino, Gordon J Ackley, Sharlene A Ackley, Leah E Pampanelli, Kathryn H Keenan, John D Clark, Daniel R Welch, Verleria H Be'Ans, Mario Daloisio, Daniel A Milbrandt, James B McNair, Ronald W Buckert, Gregory K Walker, Royal L Avery, James J Reisinger, Sherman Simpson. (Rogers, Charles)
April 8, 2004 Filing 231 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Daniel R Haight, Warren F Land, Robert A Bird, David J Deisinger, Jimmy L Wright, Thomas A Young, Edna L James, Richard R Sullivan, Laurie Cuthbert, Alex Prad Jr, Samuel L Personte, James R Blake, Robert F Lyaski, Thomas C Burgo. (Rogers, Charles) Modified on 4/12/2004 (JL, ).
April 8, 2004 Filing 230 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Rick D Mathewson, Daniel R Haight, Warren F Land, Robert A Bird, Jimmy L Wright, Thomas A Young, Dona J Jackson, John H Gibson, James R Blake, Elena T Haight, Edna L James, Richard R Sullivan, Barbara A Drexel, Laurie Cuthbert, Mary Ellison, Samuel L Personte, Robert F Lyaski, Thomas C Burgo. (Rogers, Charles) Modified on 4/12/2004 (JL, ).
April 8, 2004 Filing 229 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Ralph M Gardiner, Marcella R Golding, Gerald A Mayback, Kathleen Morales, Ronald J Sharpe, Thomas J Eisenhauer, Carolyn P Jackson, Kurt M Reinhardt, Arienton R Thompson, Scott A Viterise. (Rogers, Charles)
April 8, 2004 Filing 228 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Ralph M Gardiner, Kathleen Morales, Gregory K Bush, Marcella R Golding, Gerald A Mayback, Ronald J Sharpe, Barbara A Uloth, Thomas J Eisenhauer, Karen M Eisenhauer, Michele W Gundlach-Besse, Arienton R Thompson, Gail A Scudder, Cassandra D Smith, Deborah Simmons, Mildred Boles, Gregg S McCarthy. (Rogers, Charles)
April 7, 2004 Filing 227 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Linda A Reagan, Matthew J McOmber, Tanya E Garzon, Allen Young, Leora E DiMuro,Duglas Schoenweitz, David R Thomas, Howard R Loveless, Sidney K Harris, Fanny L Owens. (Rogers, Charles) Modified on 4/8/2004 (JL, ).
April 7, 2004 Filing 226 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Linda A Reagan, Ronald G Henderson, Steven G Pierce, Matthew J McOmber, Helin Wright, Allen Young, David W Johnson, Howard R Loveless, Leora E DiMuro,Douglas Schoenweitz, David R Thomas, Lyda M Bellamy, Fanny L Owens, Victor D Miglietta, Taras M Sanow, Agnes L Terrance, J R Santana Carter. (Rogers, Charles) Modified on 4/8/2004 (JL, ).
April 7, 2004 Filing 225 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Edward N Cecchino, Rodney J LeFrois, Martin J Bleier, Donald R Ewing, LeVern Burrows, Leon W Magin Jr, Kenneth F Pawlaczyk, Stanley W Curry, Gary E Hettler, Miracle Maurice, Mark W Woodruff, Daniel J Bischoping, Brian F Murray, Franklin D Harvey, Ida D Salisbury, Thomas R Hendrick, Lisa M Sutton, Matthew P Lockhart, Judith A Lynch, Dawn R Strong, Charles H Strong, Wayne C Wilson, Robert G Krenzer, Richard E Walker. (Rogers, Charles)
March 31, 2004 Filing 224 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Leon W Magin Jr, Thomas R Hendrick, Kenneth F Pawlaczyk, Miracle Maurice, Alicia Munson, Mark W Woodruff, Daniel J Bischoping, Paul M Malarz, Gary A Page, Brian F Murray, Cecelia O Harris-Harvey, Franklin D Harvey, Ida D Salisbury, Martin J Bleier, Matthew P Lockhart, Willette N Tanksley, Judith A Lynch, Dawn R Strong, Linda L Clark, Charles H Strong. (Rogers, Charles)
March 31, 2004 Filing 223 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Jacquelyn W Karkos, Linda M Teall, John F Flanagan, Lance E Benjamin, Lorna M Hylton, Robert J Rowles, Frederick H Montgomery, Eric W Wagoner, Cora L Young, Barbara B Heinsler, Do-Ries Roberts, George Battaglini, Gerard C Janas, James A Kimmel, Alan G Volkmar, Marie I Marshall, Linda Dorsey-Davis, Peter Szabo, James S Bromley, Edward R Connell. (Rogers, Charles)
March 31, 2004 Filing 222 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Edward R Connell, James S Bromley, Linda Dorsey-Davis, Alan G Volkmar, Shaye M Holly, Marie I Marshall, Raffaella Colaprete, Richard M Spencer, Gerard C Janas, Gina M Desimone, Michael Rathke, David J LeRoy, George Battaglini, Do-Ries Roberts, La-Resha A Roberts, Barbara B Heinsler, Eric W Wagoner, Betty A Holmes, Frederick H Montgomery, Barbara A Grant, Robert J Rowles, Bethany J Edwards, Lorna M Hylton, Regina F Bell, Thomas H Bishop, Lance E Benjamin, Peter Szabo, John F Flanagan, Linda M Teall, Linda P Madigan, Linda L Gaddis, Wanda Heard, Lisa R Robinson. (Rogers, Charles)
March 29, 2004 Filing 221 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of John B Bissanti, James A Mick, Bruce L Sullivan, Thomas F Masterton, Jason K Wong, Vlade R Endulovski, David R Bauman, Francis L Corsi Jr, Donald P Camp, Donald A Carusone, Kelly A Murphy. (Rogers, Charles)
March 29, 2004 Filing 220 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of James A Mick, Bruce L Sullivan, Thomas F Masterton, Ray Capestany, Alan F Wong, Vlade R Endulovski, Jason K Wong, Milton E Ruffin, Christopher A Lenzi, Thomas P Davis, Sharon K Stone, Herbert W Rowling, Donald A Carusone, Angie S Sutera, Helmut Menge, Phyllis J Tucker, Kay Richards, Ronald L Jackett, Kelly A Murphy, Kevin F Carter, Francis L Corsi Jr, Richard T Williams, William M Childs Jr, Vasana Vilavong. (Rogers, Charles)
March 25, 2004 Filing 219 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Robert L Cunningham, Kevan A Richardson, Eric Dreeson, Robert M Austen, Robert H Friedl, Edward J Roberts, Henry M Albert III, Mary E Russello, Albert Tosto, Jose A Escobar, Stephen F Ruef, Sarah E Lively, Deborah H Souder, Christopher A Harris, Steven M Stokes, Andrew D McElwain, Howard Nelson Sr, Lynda A Plizga, John D LeBerth, Peter J Chapman, Roy B Nowack, Michael C Moody, James R Gerhardt, John G Swartzenberg, Eric M Christianson, Troy L Nesmith, Recia M Wright, David C Alt. (Rogers, Charles)
March 25, 2004 Filing 218 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Robert L Cunningham, Kevan A Richardson, Robert M Austen, Mary E Russello, Robert H Friedl, Albert Tosto, Gary R Whitney, Jose A Escobar, Henry M Albert III, Paul R Urtel Jr, Janet L Felgenhauer, Joseph J Novick, Sarah E Lively, Daniel Pacheco, Steven M Stokes, Connie J Slagle, Howard Nelson Sr, Lynda A Plizga, John D LeBerth, Peter J Chapman, Roy B Nowack, Michael C Moody, Eric T Raymond, Margaret A Carey, Felix Garcia Jr, Joan C Bigham, James R Gerhardt, Carol A Desimone, Shaun O Coolbaugh, John G Swartzenberg, Kurt M Reinhardt, Michael J Lococo Jr, Recia M Wright, Willard Cherry, Timothy D McCown, Ray J Coleman, David M Baldwin. (Rogers, Charles)
March 24, 2004 Filing 217 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of James W Elliott, Timothy P Whelehan, William C Minnie, Geraldine Lewis, Richard C Seitz Jr, Evelyn M DeMott, Dorothy J Manuel, George H Gillott, James J Barrett. (Rogers, Charles)
March 24, 2004 Filing 216 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Carmen E Stio Sr, William Hine, Ruth A Tisdale, Robert J Canuti, Aaronda Stanley, Jeffrey C Peoples, Jerome R Krug Jr, Henry F Ochs, Randall G Houghton, Gerald Allison. (Rogers, Charles)
March 24, 2004 Filing 215 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Cheryl A Alliet-Stulpin, William Hine, Aaronda Stanley, Sandra I Mattice Rogers, Cynthia A Gayden, Rudy Trick, Gerleen G Beaty, John D Broadhead, Shirlene P Davis, Donald A Schafer, Jerome R Krug Jr, Henry F Ochs, Michael G Knepshield, Earline P Scott, Ronald C Toomey, Teresa R Grayson, Peter R Monsees. (Rogers, Charles)
March 24, 2004 Filing 214 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Ira D Merritt, Teddie Brantley, Jerry M Perrin, David W O'Mara, Paul P Gentile, Donald D Allen, Harvey D Specht, Richard L Brugnoni, Robert T Smith, Lorene A Yantachka, Felix Morales, Cheryl A Sanders, Peggy A Brunson, Vincent T Porcelli, Dianne V Appleton, Victor L Burroughs, Marlene McKinley, Eudean Smith, Peter N Bacel, Darlene L Bacel, Brenda K Winters, Larry J Wingate, Jeffrey J Hagen, Roger W Haak, Francesco A Marino, Charles H Williams Jr, Valerie D Lewis, Vera Harris, David R Appleton, Donald E Be'Ans, Andrew J Burke, Philip J Dale, Alma W Gilman, Robert T Sylvester, John C Schultz, Alan T Taylor, Donald G Silvernail, Mark E Whiteside, Thomas Vintaloro. (Rogers, Charles)
March 23, 2004 Filing 213 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of James W Elliott, Merton D Joyles, Robert J Canuti, Latasha R Sinkler, William C Minnie, Ruth A Tisdale, Geraldine Lewis, James M Flanagan, Judy R Wescott, Harry T Andrews, Michael G Haubner, Lawrence D Meston, Robert A Campana, Joan B Scheiderich, James J Barrett. (Rogers, Charles)
March 23, 2004 Filing 212 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of James C Wilkins, Ira D Merritt, Jerry M Perrin, David W O'Mara, Paul P Gentile, Harvey D Specht, Robert T Smith, Julieann Perez Parrish, Paul E Hood, Abasi A Kitt, Anthony P Privitera, Richard D Gause, Raphael S Riche, Lorene A Yantachka, Felix Morales, Vincent A Magguilli, Dwayne Harris, Vincent T Porcelli, Sanford B Hoffman, Dianne V Appleton, Victor L Burroughs, Marlene McKinley, Mario A Rodriguez Jr, Eudean Smith, Peggy A Brunson, Grant M Kosten, Peter N Bacel, Mary M Durbin, Darlene L Bacel, Alex J Heard, Raymond V Miller, Jacqueline M Monahan, Thomas J Garvia. (Rogers, Charles)
March 23, 2004 Filing 211 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Larry J Wingate, Ronald St Pierre, Joseph B Morgan, Leo H Rhodes Jr, Gerald W Stowe, Patricia M Wittman, Andrea DeVault, Linda G Biaselli, George H Fitzgerald Jr, Calvin E Manning, Steven C Fisher, Christopher D Wagner, Nkrumah K Mabry, Valerie D Lewis, Joanne Feder, Vera Harris, John A Sill Jr, Judith A Cutaia, Joseph A Inclema, Cheryl A Sanders, Kelvin S Seawright, David R Appleton, Mark A McKeehan, Michael J Albright, Paul T Wischmeyer, Philip J Dale, Alma W Gilman, Ippolito Cardella, Alan T Taylor, Robert T Sylvester, Jewel D Crisler, Ada R Washington. (Rogers, Charles)
March 23, 2004 Filing 210 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Michael R Gray, David G Dalykas, Ramon J Cancilleri, Kenneth S Bumpus, Jeffrey L Linza, Aretha M Session, Ronald E Whitney, Thomas R Hillpot, Dale W Giddings, Inez R Cooper, Antonio Furgiuele, David R Zona, James D Gill, John R Ellenberger, Linda J VerStreate, Audry A Malcolm, Tien T Nguyen, Joan R Burkis, Hattie M Reed, Lauren Calabresi, Larry C Storms, Kent C Stebbins, Ronald P Rice, Linda J Cooper, William A Boone, Patricia A Housel, Margaret M Fandel. (Rogers, Charles)
March 22, 2004 Filing 209 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Carlos Valderrama, Renard D Paulin, David G Dalykas, Ramon J Cancilleri, David A Love, Ronald E Whitney, Thomas R Hillpot, Jeffrey L Linza, Julianne Russello, Inez R Cooper, Alethia M Moore, Antonio Furgiuele, James D Gill, Terance G Buckley, John R Ellenberger, Dorothy A Welsh, Linda J VerStreate, Audry A Malcolm, Scott D Swan, Jean Z Sacheli, Ceferino Viera Jr, Joan R Burkis, Lauren Calabresi, Karen A Opel, Kent C Stebbins, Pamela Lane, William A Boone, William E Dyke, Aretha M Session. (Rogers, Charles)
March 22, 2004 Filing 208 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Willie D Ridley, Robert P Dank, David B Prince, Joseph Jones, Gary W Raymond, Jeanette Johnson, Guy M Ellis, David G Hadsell, Michael J Melich, Donna L LaClair, Patrick T Culhane, Pandora D Leach, Kevin L Williams, Everett R Boyken, David E Klender, Elaine D Masiuk, Richard L Smith, Richard A Johnson, Mark S Kwiatkowski. (Rogers, Charles)
March 22, 2004 Filing 207 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Ronald P Rice, Mark S Kwiatkowski, Karen M Koksal Neuscheler, Pandora D Leach, Patrick T Culhane, Donna L LaClair, Larry T Krech, Elaine D Masiuk, David M Brown, David E Klender, Everett R Boyken, Timothy G Hume, Kevin L Williams, Richard A Johnson, Robert E Chatterton, Willie D Ridley, Robert P Dank, Thomas L Newman, Cleveland Gipson Jr, Brian Teeter, David G Grant, Lloyd O'Meally, Joseph Jones, Jeanette Johnson, Larry G Pearston, Kathy J Buscemi, James L Nelson, Joseph F McKinney, Jeff M McKinley, Jennifer E Dunn, Sean A Green, Michael J Melich. (Rogers, Charles)
March 22, 2004 Filing 206 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Henry F Staab Jr, James J Schaber, James R Burdick, Robert H Meyers, Brian A Brown, Kathleen A Dixon, Gary A Scudder, Charles W Sanford, Daniel N O'Connor, Dennis R Guarino, Arlene G Neuhaus, Gwendolyn M Dance, Aaron T Smith, Arthur L Austin, Mattie B Sutton, Rosa L Thomas, Danica Purdev, Walter L Williams, Craig Houck, Robert B Jordan, Sandra L Lippa, Karl L Bonnell, James R Martin, Floyd A Milliman, Clarence P Klatt, Martha M Moses, Carrie V Rice, Mark D McOmber, William T Smith, Randy R Yates, Jamie L Cuyler, James B Civitello, John P Murfin. (Rogers, Charles)
March 17, 2004 Filing 205 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Timothy J Meisenzahl, Robert F Schultz, Henry F Staab Jr, James J Schaber, Kenneth W Gage, Daniel N O'Connor, Walter L Williams, Keith L Hayes, Shawn P Corke Sr, Kathleen A Dixon, Sarah D Burton, Stephen W Karle, Gary A Scudder, Robert F Jessen, Eileen E Gary, Arlene G Neuhaus, Danny T Gell, Gwendolyn M Dance, Aaron T Smith, T Ann Kohler, Ronald A Kuehne, Arthur L Austin, John F Fleig, Mattie B Sutton, Anthony L Morris, Rosa L Thomas, David W Wilson, Carrie V Rice, Ann H McGuigan, Robert H VanWuyckhuyse, Bonnie M Taylor, Craig Houck, James R Martin, Floyd Gibson, Robert B Jordan, Monroe N Green, Michael D Balling, Morden D Joyles, Christopher J Orlowski, Clarence P Klatt, Martha M Moses, David G Moses, Mark D McOmber, Marvin Scott, Jay Hiscock, Jamie L Cuyler, James J Hassler, James B Civitello. (Rogers, Charles)
March 17, 2004 Filing 204 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of James F Krantz, Kathleen M DeMarco, Brian P O'Connor, Mary L Lux, William H Remsen, Fogarty S Joseph, Dora L Daniel, Carrie Y Morrison, Joyce K Carter, Alexander S Cherwonik, Ronald J Smithski, James D Meier, Mark Waller, Mary E Wilcox, Albert E Makley, James E Parent, Norman B Carter, Kenneth E Brown, Ronald Mouzon, Deloris A Williams, Debra A Quaring, Vaughn A Schlosser, Adrianna Johnson, John R Meagher, Kenneth J Harris Jr, Eugene F Miller, Robert G Monnier. (Rogers, Charles)
March 17, 2004 Filing 203 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Catherine Pilskalns, Kevin T Hurley, Michael L Johnson, Antonio Aloisio, Wayne F Paige, Theresa L Wentworth, James S LoPresti, Jon A Pitt, Cassandra Evans, Patricia Reibstein, David L Crane, Samuel L Cooper, Richard C Jurzysta, Barbara R Jackson, Brian T Driscoll, Calvin Scott, Karen I Fuller, Susan M Morrison, Kenneth E Wright, Sherri S Rideout, Tracy L Hale, Jerome B Suplicki, Jon C Markus, James C Noyes, Joseph Britton, Joseph H Bishop, Pamela A Fusilli. (Rogers, Charles)
March 15, 2004 Filing 195 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Ronald Mouzon, Dana E Learn, Richard A Clark, Kathleen M DeMarco, Brian P O'Connor, Mary L Lux, Eugene R Diaz Jr, Donald W White, Susan M Morrison, Bok H Chun, Levi Jackson, Randall S Latragna, Fogarty S Joseph, Dora L Daniel, Carrie Y Morrison, Alexander S Cherwonik, Robin A Dispenza, Ronald J Smithski, Sandra A Dagher, James D Meier, Paul R Dalba, Albert E Makley, James J Robinson, Dorothy J Manuel, Dorothy J Thomas, Norman B Carter, Kenneth E Brown, Deloris A Williams, John C Cooper, Robert R Redmond, Debra A Quaring, John R Meagher, Robert E Lane, Gordon J Burnam. (Rogers, Charles)
March 15, 2004 Filing 194 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Eugene F Miller, James C Haskins, John E Poindexter, Michael L Johnson, Kevin T Hurley, Catherine Pilskalns, Antonio Aloisio, Tamara L Poindexter, Theresa L Wentworth, Ronnie F Simmons, Elizabeth M Veign, Laura L Thompsett, Jorge E Duckworth, James S LoPresti, Barbara R Jackson, Jeffrey S Teeter, Jon A Pitt, Kristine D Ranieri, Cassandra Evans, Kathy Thomas-Finch, Patricia Reibstein, Patrick J Burrows, David L Crane, Samuel L Cooper, Beatrice C Grover, Richard C Jurzysta, Brian T Driscoll, Madeline Torres, Karen I Fuller, Albert L Robinson, Leon R Hale Jr, Gregory S Hart, Frank T Craig, Joseph H Bishop. (Rogers, Charles)
March 15, 2004 Filing 189 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Vivian J Sparks, Judith A Heinlein, Myrtle V Burroughs, Dianne M Guggino, Silas Porchea, James Mastrodonato Jr, Clifford H Short, Betty D Crews, Timothy J Hervey, Claire T Spina, Homero Sellas, Linda Ellis-Bryant, Eric Omark, Gary M Haight, Earline P Scott, Dennie S Cunningham, Felipe P Sanabria, Janet A Hucknall, Tricia K Nenni, Thomas J Watson, Oscar B Winbush Jr, Edward C Kritz, Ronald St Pierre, Robert D Shields, William Cunningham, Angelina W James, Ronald C Hall, Yosi C Hall, Paul K Smith, Charles J Gorzynski. (Rogers, Charles)
March 11, 2004 Filing 188 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Eduardo Marrero, Jacqueline Y Jones, Evangaline Roscoe, Myrtle V Burroughs, James F Hanselman, Dorothy W Kohl, Dawn M Pomar, Billie J Brice, Charles J Gorzynski, Paul K Smith, Valenteen Reznik, Yosi C Hall, Ronald C Hall, William Cunningham, Robert D Shields, Edward C Kritz, Oscar B Winbush Jr, Thomas J Watson, Mattie M Mostiller, Patricia B Owens, Linda L Kelso, Vivian J Sparks, Tricia K Nenni, John T Hucknall, Janet A Hucknall, Karen L Caldicott, Dennie S Cunningham, Calvin Scott, Eric Omark, Linda Ellis-Bryant, Gary M Haight, Frank P Cambisi, Homero Sellas, Claire T Spina, Timothy J Hervey, Betty D Crews, Clifford H Short, Tracey M McCauley. (Rogers, Charles)
March 11, 2004 Filing 187 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Daniel J Dawson, Karen M Raysor Wieme, Stephen C Yoder, Karen L Brown, Nancy A Gambitta, Mary M Majors, Joseph L Liccione, William A DePasquale, Andrew M Nuzny, David R Becker, Paul A Lasher, Larry P Honan, William F List, Durdu M Capar, Alfred Burno, Audrey P Schell, Martin J Fahey, Danny J Daniels, Tenia M Bradley, Daniel A Millen, Beryl C Noble Jr, Jenell Roberts, Peter Franklin, Bok H Chun, Gerald A O'Neill, Charles D Carson, Gary E VanDeMortel, George Kacurovski, Douglas T Resch. (Rogers, Charles)
March 10, 2004 Filing 184 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Daniel J Dawson, Douglas T Resch, David W Kupfer, Karen M Raysor Wieme, Robert T Hochgraf, Aladino Rodriguez, Stephen C Yoder, Karen L Brown, Pamela Hunter, George Lewis, Peter J Scopa, Kevin T Axx, Willie McFadden, Walter A Reynolds, Mary M Majors, William V Coudreaut, Joseph L Liccione, Melvin M Smithers, Andrew M Nuzny, Cynthia M Clark, Paul A Lasher, B L Trafton, Susan J Mastowski, Larry P Honan, Angela M Gunn, William F List, Alfred Burno, Charles P O'Geen Jr, Audrey P Schell, Danny J Daniels, Jonathan Williams, Tenia M Bradley, Kohobi K Scott, Glenda L Hunter. (Rogers, Charles)
March 10, 2004 Filing 183 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Stan Chmiel, Stephanie J Vernile, David R Loiacono, Roger A Sheffer, Lois Walker, Joseph G Makus, Jeffrey M LaRocoue, Gary J Ciarpelli, Sheree A Colson, Josephine Galajda, Richard A Bastian, Beverly L Little, Norman P Magee, Gustav H Behner, Donald C Markham Jr, Ramon A Medina, Grace M Beniamino, Lorraine M Witt, Edward N Balling, James E Richardson, Scott B Keir, Ronald G Vinton, Lawrence J Thrash, Alice J Washington, Michael D Maddalena, Thomas A Newcomb, Virgil R Cecil, Klaus R Pohl, Clarence E Meyer, Vincent A Magguilli, Jeremiah J Nulton, Carole A Cooper, Sherwood P Pepper, Maria Luisa Rota, David A Kindt, Krystyna M Skuza. (Rogers, Charles)
March 9, 2004 Filing 180 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Stan Chmiel, Stephanie J Vernile, William E Petersen, David R Loiacono, Roger A Sheffer, Lois Walker, Michele A Ugino, Jeffrey M LaRocoue, Gary J Ciarpelli, Sheree A Colson, Josephine Galajda, Richard E Flood, Richard A Bastian, Daisy J Mack, Beverly L Little, Norman P Magee, Renee A Petralia, Joseph L Herb, Donald C Markham Jr, Ramon A Medina, Laura Ann M Scheg, Lorraine M Witt, Edward N Balling, Ronald G Vinton, Donald P Camp, Karen M Derthick, Paul P Zontek, Alice J Washington, Tameka Gaskins, Shondrell L Rutley, Renee A Piccirillo, Charles Skopinsky, Nancy J Wilson, Dennis L Ruger, Virgil R Cecil, Klaus R Pohl, Clarence E Meyer Jr, Mark A Bayer, Richard A Pahuta Jr, Jeremiah J Nulton, Jacob L McClary, Carole A Cooper, Eva M Moore, David E Rymer, Anthony S Maenza, Gerrard F Price, Sherwood P Pepper, Maria Luisa Rota, David A Kindt, Reid E Walker, James D Corder, Clifton H Wells, Charles E Fontaine. (Rogers, Charles)
March 8, 2004 Filing 175 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Clifford W Matthews, Thomas M Romano, Donald R Ennis, Shirley A Gonzalez, Paul F Bato, Salvatore Barcellona, Mary E Prescott, Diane M Steve, William Anderson, Stephen F Farress, Robin L Farress, Pamela A Jones, Douglas B Kimmel, Douglas A Conner, Johnnie E Johnson, Michael Miller, Jeroans Cathey, Robert J Dempsey, Rosa Fusco, Samuel L Thompson, Terence F Roach, Paul E Wilkosz, David R Griggs, David M Viccaro, Frank M Cutali, Glenn B Johnson, David V Ricciuto, Humberto T Ramos, David P Hogan, John T Marrapese, Lynn R Carson, Waldo R Jones, Christine M Davis, James T Krause, Ross T Fortunato, Wayne F Wallace, Raymond A Thompson, Rosa L Abram, Christine H Curry, Richard T Robinson, Lucy M Bato, Linda J Casale, Robert G Webster Jr, Kenneth R Frank, Stephen J Burrell, Ella L Cooke, Salvatore Veltre, Linda J Allen, David P Kilmer, Gerald K Hunt, Essie M Walker, Robert B Bryant, Steven R Gramlich, Alice L Harris, JoAnne L D'Agostino, Marian E Ross, Wanda E Lee, Harriet R Truesdale, Eugene Upshaw III, George M Donoghue, Gertrude T Phillips, Ramona B Miller, Bernadette M Bakewicz, Patricia G Beck, John E Tumia, Pearlie M Graham-Love, George R Bray, William E Hanes. (Rogers, Charles)
March 8, 2004 Filing 174 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Bruce R Winzenried, PHILIP YITSIS, John J Shakeshaft, Ross H Miles, Patricia A Miles, Diane A Nelson, Margaret F Green, Charles R Marshall, David L Sciarratta, Evan H Cady, Carol A Johns, Donald P Buongiorne, Patricia A Ingle, Neil R Wamser, Betty S Culver, Richard S Giuliano, Glen D Gursslin, Johnny Yancey, Gary W Melvin, James E Lesnieski, Salvatore Mastantuono, H W Hibbard, John D Scanlon, Linda K Roberts, Jack W Dorf, Wally Andrews, William L Terra, Daniel C Bement, John E Gabel, Richard L Fonda, Daniel B Seabry, Susan V Kartes, Trellis L Jones, Mary C Houseman, Gregory A Westacott, Charles Holmes Jr, Paul E Richards, Robert L Carter Sr, Debra C Thompson, David A White, Douglas J Thiel, Terry L Ridley, Paul A Rolfe, Wayne W Moore, Linda Wilkins, Kirk P Wagar, Martha D Fernberg, Tommy V Evarts, Sandra A Zeiner. (Rogers, Charles)
March 5, 2004 Filing 173 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Gary G Walters, Ramon Ruiz, James L Lawhorn, James K Emerson, Rosetta H Thomas, Eric M Morrison, John G Salter II, Willie M Edwards, William P Boyle, Craig A Marshall, James E Smith, Carl R Lyman, Joy D Smith, Edward Baranowski, Alex Matthews, Kevin R Martin, Frank M Toal, Lenward C Breedlove, Richard J Turpyn, Paul R Bellis, Darryl R Dunlap, Thomas D Belmont, Richard M Mistretta, Thomas E Kauffman, Jeffrey J Kukura, Paul A Loeb, Jerrold J Platt, Robert D Phillips, William J Luciano, Rochester Butler, Mary A Baker, John H Riehl, Terence R Orden, Gerald D Pitt, Nicola Giordano, Michael C Sanfilippo, Thomas J Jackson, James C Morrison, Kenneth Baxter, Vincent M Kurinskas, Perry Jackson, Kevin C Cometa, Theodore W Werner, Dennis M Joy, Gary S Fiske, Roger H Cottrell, Allen H Potter III, Michael B Eckman, Albert G Pritchard, Timothy W Pagel, Ann Burgess, Betty J king, Randy E Gobeyn, Patricia B Owens, Thomas J Pickens, Walter kniaziuk. (Rogers, Charles)
March 5, 2004 Filing 172 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Donna M Privitere, James T Krause, George M Donoghue, Cheryl D Mills, Clifford W Matthews, Thomas M Romano, Donald R Ennis, Shirley A Gonzalez, James P Baybutt, Gwen Viele, Paul F Bato, Samuel F Graham, David E Hayes, Todd M Dernbach, Salvatore Barcellona, Mary E Prescott, Jo R Cochran, Diane M Steve, Lee C Ellison, Stephen F Farress, Robin L Farress, Pamela A Jones, Steven J Musson, Douglas A Conner, Johnnie E Johnson, William A Lowery, Jeroans Cathey, Vitaliano Fusco, Paul W Raab, Ollie M Dunham, Barbara J Massey, Brian J Schenk, Samuel L Thompson, Patricia A Lefort, Terence F Roach, Paul E Wilkosz, Miriam Patterson, Beth A Veley, Stacey L Slaven, David M Viccaro, Frank M Cutali, David V Ricciuto, Humberto T Ramos, David P Hogan, Carmen C Marano, John T Marrapese, Waldo R Jones, Christine M Davis, Hector Ayala. (Rogers, Charles)
March 4, 2004 Filing 171 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Lucy M Bato, Ross T Fortunato, Wayne F Wallace, Raymond A Thompson, Beverly A Simone, Christine H Curry, Richard T Robinson, Joseph A Ward, Richard T Halsey, Wanda E Lee, Linda J Casale, Anthony J Casserino, Robert G Webster Jr, Elaine M Parizek, Kenneth R Frank, Stephen J Burrell, Barbara A Matthews, Salvatore Veltre, Linda J Allen, Godfrey S White, Peter K Berenbaum, Glenn B Johnson, James M Rinaldi, Marshall Thomas Sr, Theodore W Werner, David P Kilmer, Michelle M Gross, William R Laidlaw, Gerald K Hunt, Irvine L Marshall, Clifton Austin, Anthony Shoemaker, Robert B Bryant, Ross M Wilder, Steven R Gramlich, Mark W Padgham, Ramona B Miller, Keith D Hilsinger, Bernadette M Bakewicz, Patricia G Beck, Priscella Burch, Todd M Wyant, John E Tumia, Pearlie M Graham-Love, Brenda L Delyser, George R Bray, William E Hanes, Eugene Upshaw II., Alice Harris(Rogers, Charles) Modified on 3/5/2004 (JL, ).
March 3, 2004 Filing 170 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Kenneth Baxter, Laurence B Raymond, James P Overmyer, James C Morrison, Arlene G Maynard, Linda A Lehtonen, Thomas J Francis, Alex Matthews, Deidra A Clifton-Goolsby, Mary A Baker, Rochester Butler, Timothy A Walker, Robert D Phillips, Jerrold J Platt, Paul A Loeb, Annie M Rainge, Thomas E Kauffman, Linda D Swaney, Richard M Mistretta, Thomas D Belmont, Leland C Henderson, Linda K Johnson, Darryl R Dunlap, Richard W Start, Paul R Bellis, Gertrude T Phillips, Michele M Johnson, Lee E Davis, Janet R Pencola, Cathryn A Labuszewski, Michele Mourer-Parrish, Richard J Turpyn, Lenward C Breedlove, Frank M Toal, Kevin R Martin, Christine M Trimm, Beth A Parslow, Terence R Orden, Edward Baranowski, Joanne Monds, Michael Marion, Darnell L Henry, Joy D Smith, Robert E Hendler, James E Smith, George Diaz, Patricia J Guck, Richard G Wagner, Craig A Marshall, William P Boyle, Willie M Edwards, John G Salter II, Phillamay N Chin, John M Rose, Jenell Roberts, Vivian Y Newport, Troy L Andrews, Eric M Morrison, Ronald J Yancone, Bernard A Gause, Rosetta H Thomas, Sylvester Thomas, Freddie J Glover, Yolanda E Green, James L Lawhorn, Ramon Ruiz, Gary G Walters. (Rogers, Charles)
March 3, 2004 Filing 169 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Nancy Weston, Sandra A Zeiner, Kirk P Wager, Linda Wilkins, Patricia A Wager, Joseph Mistretta, Maxine Harris, David A White, Robert L Carter Sr, Paul Richards, Bruce F Schultz, Charles Holmes Jr, Gregory A Westacott, Mary C Houseman, Trellis L Jones, Susan Kartes, Daniel Seabry, Michael B Eckman, Holly B Donofrio, Jonathan L Schulman, Richard L Fonda, John E Gabel, Daniel C Bement, Thomas Pickens, Michael J Slivick, Wally Andrews, David Sharp, Linda K Roberts, Joseph D Forte, Julie A Case, John D Scanlon, Julio Mora, Vaughn K Jones, H W Hibbard, Russell Ingam, Robert J Mason, Kenneth Gibson, Marshall B haas, Louis W Larson, James E Lesnieski, Ronald J Normandin, Laurence J Curley, Gary H Sedore, Thaddeus Christopher, Ruth E Manley, Gary Melvin, Walter A Faber, Johnny Yancey, Glen Gursslin, Kendell M Urbonas, Carrie B Jones, Richard S Giuliano, Betty S Culver, Michael L Rose, Neil R Wamser, James E Snell, Donald P Buongiorne, Cynthia Clanton, Sylvia M Auch, Charles R Marshall, Peter L Barry, Diane Nelson, Margaret Green, Patricia Miles, MILES ROSS, PHILIP YITSIS, Betty J king. (Rogers, Charles)
February 27, 2004 Filing 202 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of James D. Wiemer, James F. Hagins, Gwendolyn Y. Worth, Thelma M. Jeffries, Rocky I Vasquez, Patricia A. McKinley, Johnnie M. Floyd, Lila O. Bethmann, Kevin Rappenecker, Victor Beletzky, Robert F. Gaglione, Douglas Anderson, John L. Davis, Joseph J. Galajda, Steven Sensenbach, Peter P. Mazzone, Timothy W. Arnold, Andrew D. Blaise, Tier L. Thomas, Edyth L. Strong, Dafang Z. Davidson, Jeffery J. Gadomski, Stewart C. Sedore, Richard F. Hasselberg, Donald H. Sherman, Jr., Peter G. Osborn, Stephen R. Stott, Timothy W. Pagel, John D. Foy, Ronlad J. Obstarczyk, Gary L. Knepshield, James G. Blum, Maureen M. Gagnon. (JL, )
February 27, 2004 Filing 201 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Juanita R. Stuckey, Gloria J. Pugh, Jacqueline D. Losapio, Joseph J. Franklin, Jr., Rene R. Weidinger, Sherry H. Wray, Ronald T. Belczak, Theodore R. Boccuzzi, John E. Stern, Evelyn J. Erwin, Donald S. MacIntyre, Richard S. Howell, Terreance L. Blad, Patricia M. Pearce, Douglas J. Lynch, Paul Dill, Edward J. Krysinski, Richard V. Bloom, Earl W. Parker, Johanna M. Barry, Stephen M. Ellis, Gertrude Kinard, Douglas R. Salisbury, Patricia A. Rask, Leroy Johnson, Mark E. Nacy, Michelle M. King, Ralph R. Reichart, Benjamin J. Caputo, Fletcher Tucker, Jr., Carl M. Mertz, Edith M. Clark, Vaughn C. Pembroke, Carter L. Brown, John V. Hickey, Willie J. Howard, Troy L. Andrews, Annie L. Sheffa, Thomas A. Malinowski, Joseph A. Ricciuto, Lyda M. Bellamy, Bridgett A. Gee, Rnald J. Obstarczyk, George L. Frongetta, Reginald L. Daymon, Howard Johnson, Sr., Clinton Johnson, Anthony J. Jackson, Sadie J. Redfield, Daniel L. Perkins, Gwen Viele, Christine Lucien, Frank J. Bischoping, Alfred O Bitek, David F. Littlefield, Linda L. Hartung, Terry B. Blanchard, Nancy L. Palumbo, Randall A. Emison, Alison M. Zelter, Valenteen Reznik, Peggy A. Hall, Daniel J. Martin, Sylveira C. Russell, Roy E. Betteridge (Attachments: #1)(JL, )
February 27, 2004 Filing 200 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Ronald J. Fenner, Larry R. Gore, Thap V. Vongsena, Joseph R. Schmerbeck, Edwin J. Moore, John L. Robinson, Douglas A. McPherson, Antonio J. Dlallo, Barbara A. Juzwiak, David Maar, Richard T. Horn, Joseph B. Coleman, Gordon P. Rask, Jr., Mark E. Coleman, Mildred Turner, Larry D. Lott, Charles J. Alongi, Eugenio Alvarez, Thomas M. Schaefer, Joyce A. Alexander, Patricia A. Griffin, Audria R. Sutton, Judith F. Nasca, Michelle A. Camp, Patricia J. Loop, David Wilbern, Bernice M. Miller, Michael W. Hayes, Dwight D. Dengler, Thoams A. Grab, David Bendert, Joseph G. Giglio, Johnnie M. Johnson, Gilda C. Wooten, Maggie L. Carter, Michael D. Smith, Joanne J. Speranza, Margaret L. Sitzer, Blanche L. Nix, David E. Fox, Mary E. Luca, Richard N. Nasca, Stanley G. Cowans, Daniel T. Rook, Maryann Riccardi, Linda S. Amoroso, Kimberly M. Watkins, Daneil D. Driffill, Christopher D. Clarkson, Edna P. Williams, Daniele J. Riccardi, Michelle M. Cook, Richard E. Gerber, Sally D. Sleight, Kelvin L. Davis, Gregory J. Mannara, Valerie S. Amo, Robyn A. Boler, Kathleen Glass (Attachments: #1)(JL, )
February 27, 2004 Filing 199 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Jerry P. Schaertel, Donald K. Starr, Josephine M. Conte, Rodney W. Kilner, Terri J. Utter, Daniel C. Metzler, Joseph R. Pauline, Joy B. Rodas, Stephen L. Korn, Ronald A. Gerth, Jeffery J. Gadomski, Stewart C. Sedore, Donald H. Sherman, Jr., Peter G. Osborn, Ronlad F. Sauers, James G. Blum, Maureen M. Gagnon, David S. Beehner, Gerald A. Andrychuk, David F. Conger, Jeffrey T. Fischer, Joachim A. Kahmke, Darryl E. Carter, Paul S. Specksgoor, Robin R. Rosier, Klaus D. Henkes, Gregory R. Bennett, Marjorie H. Thulin, Richard L. Hodge, Edyth L. Strong, Edward Wilson, Peter R. Terrell, Jr., Darin J. Everdyke, Willie C. Tookes, Robert C. Nichol, Jr., James A. Marra, Leland C. Henderson, Edward J. Dangler, Thomas L. Braden, Nicole A. Stallworth, William W. Breadon, Henry A. Tuffo, Vivian Y. Newport, Scott A. Abramson, Edward W. Sitzer, Edward W. Emery, Elena T. Haight, Anthony S. Maenza, Patricia J. Guck, Calvin Thurman, Marilyn J. Revell, Lila O. Bethmann, James J. Chantra, Jr., Richard G. Hoffman, Paul J. MacKanos, Jr., Gregoria A. Thomas, Philip Conrad, Gerard J. Ryan, Scott W. Spring, Clifford J. Jerome (JL, )
February 27, 2004 Filing 198 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Richard J. Krahenbuhl, Denise McGill, Ronald H. Meyer, Stephen M. Pierleoni, Daniel E. Callahan, Joseph A. Lemark, Kenneth F. Allocco, Robert E. Henderson, Nathaniel Dickerson, Joan M. Moss, Pamela J. Markus, James F. Hagins, James D. Wiemer, Patricia A. McKinley, Johnnie M. Floyd, Barbara A. Kastner, Victor Beletzky, Huey Mcray, Jr., James J. Daggett, Joseph J. Galajda, Steven Sensenbach, Scott Simpson, Jasmail Singh, Timothy W. Arnold, Laurence S. Camp, Jason J. Galajda, Michael J. Sixt, Thomas G. Pastecki, Emmett L. Peters, Ora L. Pendergrass, Thomas F. Weidenbach, Helen C. Stell, David R. Reece, Eugene R. McGlynn, Thomas M. Church, Purvis Arline, Jr., Ronald J. Masiewicz, Richard J. Modzelewski, Sharon M. Clark, Paul S. Kuchman, Christopher w. Wood, James A. Altobelli, Timothy M. Halton, Richard Curatalo, Fatina D. Houston, Conrad B. Cote, Paul C. Tennity, Michael D. Dron,. (JL, )
February 27, 2004 Filing 197 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of David Wilbern, Douglas C. Sanford, Thoams A. Grab, David J. Travis, Marian E. Ross, Patricia J. Loop, Audria R. Sutton, Michelle A. Camp, Patricia A. Griffin, Michael Roby, Annie Heyward, Peter R. Truelson, Jr., Judith F. Nasca, Pedro C. Santiago, Donald W. Alford, Annie L. Sheffa, Joseph P. Uttaro, Eugenio Alverez, Mildred Turner, Mark E. Coleman, Danny L. Everett, Gordon P. Rask, Jr., Steven E. Giverson, Charles J. Alongi, Jo Ann Smith, Douglas E. Drake, Joseph B. Coleman, Marc J. Fournier, James W. Lee, Warren L. Eckelberger, Barbara A. Juzwiak, Antonio J. Dlallo, Douglas A. McPherson, Joseph R. Schmerbeck, Benito Fusco, Owen L. Bostick, Larry R. Gore, Ronald J. Fenner, Joyce Y. Newton, Thomas M. Greggs, Richard Alston, Anthony J. Jackson, Juanita R. Stuckey, Alfred O. Bitek, Aszie D. Rivers, Calvin Thurman,. (JL, )
February 27, 2004 Filing 196 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Gregory P. Kwiatkowski, Gregory J. Mannara, Michelle M. Cook, Douglas R. Hall, Ronald A. Disano, Elizabeth Cotton, Eric M. Dukes, Kevin L. Davis, Paul R. Poudrier, Daniele J. Riccardi, James C. Saulter, Victor Dusovic, Sally D. Sleight, Latoya Bliss, Daniel D. Drifeill, Kimberly M. Watkins, Donna D. Steinmetz, Linda S. Amoroso, Maryann Riccardi, Daniel T. Rook, Richard N. Nasca, Maggie M. Robinson, George L. Frongetta, Solidea P. Krupa, Willie J Howard, Russell K. Vanderlinden, Alfred A. Anderson, Robert Ruff, Gilda C. Wooten, Johnnie M. Johnson, Michael D. Smith, Bernadette M. Dengler, Jeff P. Wawrzaszek, David Bendert, Michael Buczko, Joseph G. GiglioMichael W. Hayes, Bernice M. Miller. (JL, )
February 27, 2004 Filing 193 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Terrence L. Blad, Paul Dill, Donald S. MacIntyre, Carl Lamar, Richard S. Howell, Linda L. Hartung, James A. Maenza, Willie F. Baggling, Evelyn J. Erwin, Michaele R. Blanchard, Theodore R. Boccuzzi, Carolyn A. Butts, Sam Phongsamouth, Steven F. Flansburg, John E. Stern, David F. Momot, Sherry H. Wray, Ronald T. Belczak, Charles G. Brenson, Myra B. Dewey, Susan A. Munzert, Richard V. Olechnowicz, Reginald L. Daymon, Rene R. Weidinger, Paul J> Bachman, Joseph J. Franklin, Jr., Jacqueline D. Losapio, Gloria J. Pugh, Robyn A. Boler, Karleen E. Ladue, Wayne R. Kaminski, Valerie S. Amo, Richard E. Gerber, Thomas L. Braden. (JL, )
February 27, 2004 Filing 192 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Jacqueline A. Kolb, Laurie A. Spencer, John V. Hickey, Carter L. Brown, John W. Wright, Nancy L. Palumbo, Larry M. Myers, Richard E. Schmanke, Micael A. O'Connell, Jr., Michael L. Bailey, Kenneth M. Naugle, Vangelio Rivas, Fletcher Tucker, Jr., Benjamin J. Caputo, Patricia Brunson, Quinton R. Jeffries, Ralph R. Reichhart, Mark E. Nacy, Laura A. Chamberlain, Leroy Johnson, Patricia A. Rask, Johanna M. Barry, Louis Divincenzo, Stephen M. Ellis, Earl W. Parker, Richard V. Bloom, Patricia M. Pearce. (JL, )
February 27, 2004 Filing 191 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of David S. Beehner, David F. Conger, Matthew A. Dennis, Brian J. Kahmke, Jeffrey T. Fischer, Joachim A. Kahmke, Curtis L. Vernon, Darryl. E. Carter, Paul S. Specksgoor, Nicole A. Stallworth, Robin R. Rosier, Klaus D. Henkes, Cynthia M. Henderlong, Marjorie H. Thulin, Richard L. Hodge, Stephen L. Korn, Stephen M. Pierleoni, Ronald A. Gerth, Lillian G. Spaulding, Robert C. Verstraten, David C. Balkum, Mark R. Clark, Robert D. Faulkner, Jerry P. Schaertel, Daniel J. Martin, Jean E. Clark, Donald K. Starr, Robert E. Ely, Rodney W. Kilner, Frank E. Chardeen, Klaus G. Zwinger, Roy E. Betteridge, Kathleen T. Turpyn, Edward Wilson, Daniel C. Metzler, Joseph R. Pauline, Lisa A. Selden, Phyllis A. Selden, Clifford Jerome, Donald B. Hunter. (Attachments: #1)(JL, )
February 27, 2004 Filing 190 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Willie C. Tookes, Barbara J. Crocitti, Judith A. Steffer, Henry A. Tuffo, Tammy C. Thomas, Joyce A. Alexander, James J. Chantra Jr., Richard G. Hoffman, Lincoln P. Lew, Earlene S. Wilson, Tynisah L. Sibley, Paul J. MacKanos, Jr., Brian Marriott, Gregorio A. Thomas, Philip V. Conrad, Gerard J. Ryan, Scott W. Spring, Warren Dingle, Sr., Ora L. Pendergrass, Paul C. Tennity, Helen C. Stell, David R. Reece, Willie J. Thompson, Christopher W. Wood, Eugene R. McGlynn, Thomas M. Church, Purvis Arline Jr., Silas Worth, Richard J. Modzelewski, Paul S. Kuchman, Richard A. Sliker, Ro Vitale, James A. Altobelli, Fatina D. Houston, Conrad B. Cote, Laurence S. Camp, William P. Connelly, Jasmail Singh, Kathleen Galajda, Jason J. Galajda, Michael J. Sixt, Thomas G. Pastecki, Sheila d. Crews-Noye, Gerald A. Farrell, Emmett L. Peters, Peggy A. Hall, Richard J. Krahenbuhl, Aisha K. Andrews, John J. Yannello, Denise McGill, Ronald H. Meyer, Daniel E. Callahan, Kenneth F. Allocco, Nathaniel Dickerson, Joan M. Moss, Pamela J. Markus. (Attachments: #1)(JL, )
February 26, 2004 Filing 186 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Eric L. Schultz, Richard V. Olechnowicz, Larry A. Gursslin, Bernard D. Chase, Jeff Williams, Jr., Dennis J. Broyld, Brian L. Vogler, Juan A. Moore, Mose J. Cooper, Craig T. Delaney, John L. Shone, David P. Diedrich, Nancy L. Muir, James V. Quick, Cheryl A. Tette, Terry E. Featherly, James D. Freville, Paul R. Messer, Willie J. Cooper, Diane H. Neal, Daniel Walters, Jr., Eugene R. Englert, Paul D. Omeara, Michael P. Jaskulski, William J. Eberts, Levite L. Vaillancourt, Eileen Longuillo, Deborah A. McBride, Frederick J. Dole, Douglas E. Graham, Jacquelyn P. Matteson, Ward T. Blasko, Victor J. Snyder, Arthur R. Jones, Elizabeth A Piendel, David F. James, Robert E. Tillard, Robert W. Dagostino, Henry L. Turner, Wilfred R. Lennox, Jr., Roger R. Roome, Karen McGill, Frederick H. Robinson, George Fontenette, Jr., Gary W. McManus, Joseph Accapezzato, Bernadine Miller, Karen V. Mathis, Jennifer S. Labounty, Willie W. Harrison, Ella M. Prior, Richard D. Shultz, Richard M. Lane, Thomas P. Hughes, Regina A. Pinkston, Maria A. Helch, Patrick Dilella, Aszie D. Rivers, Charles M. Shevlin, Warren Barr, Paul A. Armstrong, William F. Bates. (JL, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2004 (JL, ).
February 26, 2004 Filing 185 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Roger R. Roome, David J. Salmon, Mark Belicove, Juan A. Moore, Jeff Williams Jr., Sereena Martin, Suez E Elmore, Francis H. Keefe, Jr., Helen L. Pilittere, William M. Lipnickey, Richard A. Giancursio, Jose Ramos, David J. Gominiak, Paul C. Mosakowski, Krystyna M. Skuza, James E. Taylor, Terry E. Featherly, Jenelle G Koroly, Joan L. Daily, Nancy L. Muir, David P. Diedrich, James D. Freville, Diane H. Neal, Paul R. Messer, Daniel Walters, Jr., Willie J. Cooper, Tami A. Chick, John Elliott, Michael A. Fox, Mark E. Hennekey, Joseph W. Johnson, Ronald J. Sharp, Thomas M. Dolan, John Evans, Renee H. Mahoney, Sharon C. Grego, Thaddeus B. Drains, Gary Johnson, David Walker, Jr., Keith M. Brugger, Susan C. Trupo. (JL, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2004 (JL, ).
February 26, 2004 Filing 182 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Alexander Scott, Clement C. Odita, Miguel A. Millan, Kenneth F. Higgs, Edward A. Mager, Michael L. Savino, Ronald H. Nohe, George E. Brown, Jr., Obadiah Medlock, Richard A. Corona, Russell S. Loop, Mark E. Kowalski, James A. Schulwitz, John R. Cullerton, Charles W. Percey, Ronnie Williams, William H. Nichols, Alma Armand, Edward Lawhorn, William A. Feil, David C. Ferrara, Harry L. Moses, Kenneth A. Serow, Richard J. Vetter, donald J. Wilson, Randell A. Conderman, Clara Colaruotolo, James J. Bradley, David G. Daniels, Linda M. Biehler, Thomas E. Hobgood, Sr., Christopher P. Grattan, Lawrence R. Wamser, David E. Carson. (JL, ) Modified on 3/9/2004 (JL, ).
February 26, 2004 Filing 181 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Michael W. Shattuck, Jeffrey D. McCarthy, Joseph C. Green, Mark E. Hennekey,Sharon L. Marshall, Karen Steffenhagen, Craig W. Dick Timothy J. Feeney, Norris J. Johnson, Sr., Joseph P. Weis, James P. Calarco, James E. taylor, Thomas J. Mellen, Scott D. Swan, Douglas Anderson, John A. Fabry, Warren Dingle, Sr., Howard A. Goldstone, James L. Vincent, David J. Gominiak, Concetta C. Ott, Bonnie L. Mason, Karen L. Shone, Michael A. Fox, Sharon C. Greco, Thomas M. Dolan, Ronald J. Sharp, Theree L. Barnes, Keith M. Brugger, Michael P. Cummings, William S. Wetmore, Quinton R. Jeffries, Frank E. Chardeen, Mark R. Sauer, Donald R. Piampiano, Jo Ann Smith, David J. Travis, Peter D. Rayburn, John Elliott, Steven J. Walczak, David J. Ogrodowski. (JL ) Modified on 3/9/2004 (JL, ).
February 26, 2004 Filing 179 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of George W. Schmidt, Arthur R. Jones, Elizabeth A. Piendel, James P. Calarco, Bernadine Miller, Craig T. Delaney, Ronald H. Nohe, Obadiah Medlock, Clement C. Odita, Darrick E. Adams, George E. Brown, Jr., Donald A. Hunter, Stephen T. Henry, Michael Coakley, Derek J. Easterling, Edward A. Mager, William B. McDonald, Michael W. DeClerck, Kenneth F. Higgs, Miguel A. Millan, Donald R. Piampiano. (JL, )
February 26, 2004 Filing 178 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Charles W. Dann, James R. Sharp, William C. Crandall, Karen V. Mathis, Craig R. Buckingham, Peter J. Redding, Thomas P. Hughes, Theree L. Barnes, Ella M. Prior, Timothy J. Feeney, Gerald T. Tucker, Jennifer S. Labounty, Annie M. Graham, Kenneth Crosby, Patrick Dilella, Keith R. Lord, Mark P. Sensenbach, Maria A. Helch, Karen Steffenhagen, Charles M. Shevlin, Warren Barr, William H. Rogers, Paul A. Armstrong, Emede R. Ozuna, Eugene R. Englert, Glynis L. Singleton, Diane Baccari, Paul D. Omeara, William J. Eberts, Tioga M Cherry, Harold J. Lindley Jr., MIchael P. Jaskulski, Stephen M. Otis, Levite L. Vaillancourt, Deborah A. McBride, Frederick J. Dole, Douglas E. Graham, Jacquelyn P. Matteson, Linda J. Anderson, Ann Burgess, Michael J. Baccari, Jr., Kathleen H. Kelly, Keith B. Morgan. (JL, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2004 (JL, ).
February 26, 2004 Filing 177 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Alfred Messerschmidt, Joseph C. Green, William F. Bates, William S. Wetmore, Anthony J. Iati, Michael P Cummings, Larry D. Smith, David C. Ferrara, Harry L. Moses, Lauren A. Caster, Shawn C. Keyes, Richard A. Corona, Russell S. Loop, Robert C. Steele, Michael L. Savino, Kim L. Calloway, Ronnie Williams, Charles W. Percey, Glen P. Culverwell, John R. Cullerton, Sharon I. Marshall, Bonnie L. Mason, Frederick H. Robinson, Charles T. Taylor, Karen McGill, Edward Lawhorn, Alma Armand, William H. Nichols, Melissa O. Green, Gary W. McManus, Joseph Accapezzato. (JL, )
February 26, 2004 Filing 176 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Steven J. Walczak, David J. Ogrodowski, Richard J. Beeley, Richard J. Vetter, Kenneth A. Serow, Norman F. Neracker, Sr., Donald J. Wilson, Randell A. Conderman, Clara Colaruotolo, Ronald J. Coyle, James J. Bradley, David G. Daniels, Willie G. Harvey, Andrew L. Gissendanner, Jr., Linda M. Biehler, James V. Quick, Donald M. Harrison, Barry F. Briffa, Jr., Charles Brooks, Glen H. Harvey, Jeffrey D. McCarthy, Michael W. Shattuck, Howard A. Goldstone, Gerard W. Smith, Ignacy Urbanski, James E. Taylor, James J. Diliberto, Jr., Gerald M. Daniels, Harriet L. Tillard, James C. Flemings, Joanne L. Castrechino, Henry L. Turner, Melvin L. Moyd, Bernard D. Chase, Larry A. Gursslin, Concetta C. Ott, Wilfred R. Lennox, Jr., Eric L. Scholtz. (JL, )
February 19, 2004 Filing 168 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Charles W. Rogers on behalf of Vincent J. Mistretta. (JL, )
February 9, 2004 Filing 167 Appeal Remark - MANDATE from USCA denying Defendant EKC's motion to file an interloctory appeal because it fails to satisfy the statutory requirements under 28 USC 1292(b) USCA# 03-8035) (MMG, )
February 4, 2004 Filing 166 AMENDED CLASS CERTIFICATION ORDER. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on January 31, 2004. (MS, )
January 21, 2004 Filing 164 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Telesca : Motion Hearing held on 1/20/2004 re #157 MOTION for Hearing filed by Eastman Kodak Company, #161 - Granted. MOTION to Expedite filed by William Robinson - Reserved. (MS, )
January 20, 2004 Filing 165 AFFIDAVIT of Service for proposed amended class certification order served on defendant on 1/20/04, filed by William Robinson, et al(JL, )
January 20, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #161 plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Class Action Notice and Expedite Notification. Signed by Judge Michael A. Telesca on 1/20/04. (MKD, )
January 20, 2004 Filing 162 AFFIDAVIT by Todd R. SHinaman for Eastman Kodak Company. (JL, )
January 16, 2004 Filing 160 AFFIDAVIT re #157 MOTION for Hearing by Eastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A&B#2 Exhibit C,D,E#3 Exhibit F,G,H,I#4 Exhibit J,K,L,M,N)(JL, )
January 16, 2004 Filing 159 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of motion to clarify this court's class certifcation order and to amend the class notification by Eastman Kodak Company. (JL, )
January 16, 2004 Filing 158 AFFIDAVIT by Stephen J. Jones for Eastman Kodak Company. (JL, )
January 16, 2004 Filing 157 MOTION for expedited Hearing by Eastman Kodak Company. (JL, )
January 13, 2004 Filing 161 MOTION for Expedited consideration of amended certification order to permit immediate class notification by William Robinson, et al. (JL, )
December 8, 2003 Filing 156 ANSWER to second Amended Complaint by Eastman Kodak Company.(JL, )
November 21, 2003 Filing 154 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eastman Kodak Company , filed by Mary Joy Josefozicz, Emmett Lee Peters, William Robinson.(JL, )
October 9, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting 146 Motion, finding as moot 148 Motion for Hearing, granting 148 Motion, granting 150 Motion . Signed by Judge Michael A. Telesca on 10/9/03. (JL, )
October 8, 2003 Filing 155 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Telesca : Motion Hearing held on 10/8/2003 re 146 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by William Robinson; submitted - no appearances (JL, )
October 6, 2003 Filing 152 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support re 150 Motion to toll the statute of limitations filed by William Robinson. (JL, )
September 26, 2003 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM by Eastman Kodak in opposition to [150-1] motion to expedite hearing and to toll the statue of limitations as to class members by William Robinson (JL)
September 19, 2003 Filing 150 MOTION by William Robinson to expedite hearing and to toll the statue of limitations as to class members court to set return date (JL) Modified on 09/29/2003
September 17, 2003 Deadline updated; Motion Hearing set for 9:00 10/8/03 for [148-1] motion for Expedited Hearing, set for 9:00 10/8/03 for [148-2] motion to Toll the Statute of Limitations as to class members' FLSA Claims retroactive to the imposition of the stay in this case and until thirty days after it is lifted (CM)
September 15, 2003 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM by William Robinson, Emmett Lee Peters, Jeffery A. Erwin, Gerleen Beaty, Wayne W. Okoniewicz, James G. Schneider, Scott W. Spring, Michelle M. Cook, Douglas A. Schoenweitz, Mary Joy Josefozicz, Frankie M. Washington, Susan Klueber, Lenora Carter, Catherine Cliff, Edward J. Dangler, Craig M. Steves, Charles H. Colf Jr., Karen Paul, Allan Saunders, Stan Bliss, Albert L. Blair, Antonio Romero, Gary R. Hillman, Clarence Edward Meter Jr., Richard L. Baase, John W. Smith Jr., Delores Miller, Willa D. Williams, John R. Keegan, Gloria Adams, Rosa Lee Thomas, Carol L. Green, Charlie Childs, Howard B. Davis, Juan A. Moore, Wayne Turner, Michael V. Luddy, Janusz Muszak, Leroy Kendrick, Robert W. D'Agostino, Thomas P. Daly, Glenda M. Videan, Theotis McNair, James R. Contreras, Donald Roy Clark Jr., Otha Worth, David C. Ferrara, Glenn C. Gebhard, Howard Goldstone, Albertha Broyld, Shirley P. Vergilia, Franklin W. Jenks, Debby G. Soriano, Michael Zawacki, Laurie Cuthbert, Susan Skivington, George E. Decker, Willie James Hayes, Michael Roby, Rosemarie Dinolfo, David L. Sciarratta, Eleanor Ann Madden, Donald E. Maley, Robert Kelly, Micki Aiken Allyn, Milton Padilla, Patricia A. McKinley Darlene R. Schuler, Michael W. General, Anita M. Brunt in support of [148-2] motion to Toll the Statute of Limitations as to class members' FLSA Claims retroactive to the imposition of the stay in this case and until thirty days after it is lifted by plaintiffs (BJB) Modified on 09/17/2003
September 15, 2003 Filing 148 MOTION by William Robinson, Emmett Lee Peters, Jeffery A. Erwin, Gerleen Beaty, Wayne W. Okoniewicz, James G. Schneider, Scott W. Spring, Michelle M. Cook, Douglas A. Schoenweitz, Mary Joy Josefozicz, Frankie M. Washington, Susan Klueber, Lenora Carter, Catherine Cliff, Edward J. Dangler, Craig M. Steves, Charles H. Colf Jr., Karen Paul, Allan Saunders, Stan Bliss, Albert L. Blair, Antonio Romero, Gary R. Hillman, Clarence Edward Meter Jr., Richard L. Baase, John W. Smith Jr., Delores Miller, Willa D. Williams, John R. Keegan, Gloria Adams, Rosa Lee Thomas, Carol L. Green, Charlie Childs, Howard B. Davis, Juan A. Moore, Wayne Turner, Michael V. Luddy, Janusz Muszak, Leroy Kendrick, Robert W. D'Agostino, Thomas P. Daly, Glenda M. Videan, Theotis McNair, James R. Contreras, Donald Roy Clark Jr., Otha Worth, David C. Ferrara, Glenn C. Gebhard, Howard Goldstone, Albertha Broyld, Shirley P. Vergilia, Franklin W. Jenks, Debby G. Soriano, Michael Zawacki, Laurie Cuthbert, Susan Skivington, George E. Decker, Willie James Hayes, Michael Roby, Rosemarie Dinolfo, David L. Sciarratta, Eleanor Ann Madden, Donald E. Maley, Robert Kelly, Micki Aiken Allyn, Milton Padilla, Patricia A. McKinley, Darlene R. Schuler, Michael W. General, Anita M. Brunt for Expedited Hearing , and to Toll the Statute of Limitations as to class members' FLSA Claims retroactive to the imposition of the stay in this case and until thirty days after it is lifted Court to set return date (BJB) Modified on 09/17/2003
August 20, 2003 Filing 147 MEMORANDUM by William Robinson in support of [146-1] motion to toll the statute of limitations or alternatively to modify the stay by William Robinson (JL)
August 20, 2003 Filing 146 MOTION by William Robinson to toll the statute of limitations or alternatively to modify the stay court to set return date (JL)
August 8, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting [140-1] motion to Stay the proceedings pending the determination of defendant's interlocutory appeal ( signed by Senior USDJ Michael A. Telesca ) Notice and copy of order sent to Charles W. Rogers, Stanley J. Matusz, Todd R. Shinaman, Mark Hannabury (JL)
August 6, 2003 Filing 145 Minute entry: [140-1] motion to Stay the proceedings and amend the order for certification - submitted (MAT) (JL)
August 5, 2003 Filing 143 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Eastman Kodak in support of [140-1] motion to Stay the proceedings and amend the order for certification by Eastman Kodak (TO)
August 4, 2003 Filing 139 MEMORANDUM by William Robinson, Emmett Lee Peters, Jeffery A. Erwin, Gerleen Beaty, Wayne W. Okoniewicz, James G. Schneider, Scott W. Spring, Michelle M. Cook, Douglas A. Schoenweitz, Mary Joy Josefozicz, Frankie M. Washington, Susan Klueber, Lenora Carter, Catherine Cliff, Edward J. Dangler, Craig M. Steves, Charles H. Colf Jr., Karen Paul, Allan Saunders, Stan Bliss, Albert L. Blair, Antonio Romero, Gary R. Hillman, Clarence Edward Meter Jr., Richard L. Baase, John W. Smith Jr., Delores Miller, Willa D. Williams, John R. Keegan, Gloria Adams, Rosa Lee Thomas, Carol L. Green, Charlie Childs, Howard B. Davis, Juan A. Moore, Wayne Turner, Michael V. Luddy, Janusz Muszak, Leroy Kendrick, Robert W. D'Agostino, Thomas P. Daly, Glenda M. Videan, Theotis McNair, James R. Contreras, Donald Roy Clark Jr., Otha Worth, David C. Ferrara, Glenn C. Gebhard, Howard Goldstone, Albertha Broyld, Shirley P. Vergilia, Franklin W. Jenks, Debby G. Soriano, Michael Zawacki, Laurie Cuthbert, Susan Skivington, George E. Decker, Willie James Hayes, Michael Roby, Rosemarie Dinolfo, David L. Sciarratta, Eleanor Ann Madden, Donald E. Maley, Robert Kelly, Micki Aiken Allyn, Milton Padilla, Patricia A. McKinley, Darlene R. Schuler, Michael W. General, Anita M. Brunt in opposition to [106-1] motion to certify class by William Robinson (TO)
August 1, 2003 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM by Eastman Kodak in support of [140-1] motion to Stay the proceedings and amend the order for certification by Eastman Kodak (JL)
August 1, 2003 Filing 141 AFFIDAVIT by Todd R. Shinaman for Eastman Kodak in support of [140-1] motion to Stay the proceedings and amend the order for certification by Eastman Kodak (JL)
August 1, 2003 Filing 140 MOTION by Eastman Kodak to Stay the proceedings and amend the order for certification Motion Hearing set for 8/6/03 (JL)
July 18, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting class certification ( signed by Senior USDJ Michael A. Telesca ) Notice and copy of order sent to Charles W. Rogers, Stanley J. Matusz, Todd R. Shinaman, Mark Hannabury (JL)
July 18, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting [130-1] motion to void releases in the TAP agreements re: overtime backpay ( signed by Senior USDJ Michael A. Telesca ) Notice and copy of order sent to Charles W. Rogers, Stanley J. Matusz, Todd R. Shinaman, Mark Hannabury (JL)
July 16, 2003 Filing 136 Minute entry: [130-1] motion to void releases in the TAP agreements re: overtime backpay - under advisement (MAT) (JL)
July 11, 2003 Filing 135 AFFIDAVIT by Eastman Kodak in opposition to [130-1] motion to void releases in the TAP agreements re: overtime backpay by William Robinson (JL)
July 11, 2003 Filing 134 MEMORANDUM by Eastman Kodak in opposition to [130-1] motion to void releases in the TAP agreements re: overtime backpay by William Robinson (JL)
July 2, 2003 Filing 133 Status conference held (MAT) (JL)
July 2, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER, directing defendant to produce items ( signed by Senior USDJ Michael A. Telesca ) Notice and copy of order sent to Charles W. Rogers, Stanley J. Matusz, Todd R. Shinaman, Mark Hannabury (JL)
June 12, 2003 Deadline updated; Motion Hearing set for 9:00 7/16/03 for [130-1] motion to void releases in the TAP agreements re: overtime backpay pursuant to notice (MAT) (JL)
May 22, 2003 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM by William Robinson, et al in support of [130-1] motion to void releases in the TAP agreements re: overtime backpay by William Robinson (JL)
May 22, 2003 Filing 130 MOTION by William Robinson, et al to void releases in the TAP agreements re: overtime backpay court to set return date (JL)
May 22, 2003 Filing 129 LETTER by plaintiff re: motion to void releases (JL)
May 13, 2003 Filing 128 LETTER by plaintiff containing plaintiff's proposed class notifications and associated forms for subclass A and subclass B (JL)
May 6, 2003 Filing 126 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding Anita M. Brunt as plaintiff (JL)
April 24, 2003 Filing 127 Status conference held (MAT) (JL)
April 9, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying [112-1] motion for an order denying plaintiff's second motion for certification of a class, granting [106-1] motion to certify class, granting [98-1] motion to Certify Class and to proceed as a collective action; plaintiffs are granted leave to add Emmett Peters and Mary Joy Josefozicz as named plaintiffs; within 10 days of the filing of this order, counsel shall meet with the curt to estqablish the terms and conditions of an order certifying the class ( signed by Senior USDJ Michael A. Telesca ) Notice and copy of order sent to Charles W. Rogers, Stanley J. Matusz, Todd R. Shinaman, Mark Hannabury (JL) (JHF).
April 8, 2003 Filing 124 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding Michael W. General as plaintiff (JL)
February 3, 2003 Filing 123 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding Darlene R. Schuler as plaintiff (JL)
January 27, 2003 Filing 122 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Patricia A. McKinley (JL)
January 21, 2003 Filing 121 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Milton Padilla (JL)
January 17, 2003 Filing 119 AFFIDAVIT by Stnaley J. Matusz for Eastman Kodak in support of [118-1] support memorandum by Eastman Kodak (JL)
December 19, 2002 Filing 120 Minute entry: [112-1] motion for an order denying plaintiff's second motion for certification of a class - submitted,; [106-1] motion to certify class - submitted; [98-1] motion to Certify Class and to proceed as a collective action - submitted (MAT) (JL)
December 17, 2002 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM by Eastman Kodak in further support of cross motion for expedited discovery (motion not filed) (JL)
December 10, 2002 Filing 116 AFFIRMATION by Charles W. Rogers for William Robinson Re: [98-1] motion to Certify Class and to proceed as a collective action by William Robinson (JL)
December 10, 2002 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM by William Robinson in support of [98-1] motion to Certify Class and to proceed as a collective action by William Robinson (JL)
December 9, 2002 Filing 117 Collective Action Opt-ion Form adding plaintiff Micki Aiken Allyn (JL)
December 3, 2002 Filing 114 AFFIDAVIT by Todd R. Shinaman for Eastman Kodak in opposition to [98-1] motion to Certify Class and to proceed as a collective action by William Robinson (JL)
December 3, 2002 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM by Eastman Kodak in opposition to [106-1] motion to certify class by William Robinson, [98-1] motion to Certify Class and to proceed as a collective action by William Robinson (JL)
December 3, 2002 Filing 112 MOTION by Eastman Kodak for an order denying plaintiff's second motion for certification of a class Motion Hearing set for 9:00 12/19/02 (JL)
December 3, 2002 Filing 111 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Robert Kelly (JL)
December 3, 2002 Filing 110 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Donald E. Maley (JL)
December 3, 2002 Filing 109 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Eleanor Ann Madden (JL)
November 27, 2002 Filing 108 AMENDED AFFIDAVIT by Emmett Lee Peters Re: [107-1] amended complaint by Mary Joy Josefozicz, Emmett Lee Peters, William Robinson (JL)
November 27, 2002 Filing 107 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT by William Robinson, Emmett Lee Peters, Mary Joy Josefozicz , amending [10-1] amended complaint by William Robinson (JL)
November 27, 2002 Filing 106 (CORRECTED) MOTION by William Robinson to certify class Motion Hearing set for 9:00 12/19/02 (JL)
November 26, 2002 Filing 105 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff David L. Sciarratta (JL)
November 26, 2002 Filing 104 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Rosemarie Dinolfo (JL)
November 26, 2002 Filing 103 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Michael Roby (JL)
November 19, 2002 Filing 102 Collective Action Opt-in form adding plaintiff Willie James Hayes (JL)
November 19, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER, set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery deadline on 12/2/02 Replies to Responses to Motions 12/16/02 ; Responses to Motions to 12/9/02 ; ( signed by Senior USDJ Michael A. Telesca ) Notice and copy of order sent to Charles W. Rogers, Stanley J. Matusz, Todd R. Shinaman, Mark Hannabury (JL)
November 15, 2002 Filing 100 AMENDED AFFIDAVIT by Mary Joy Josefozicz Re: [98-1] motion to Certify Class and to proceed as a collective action by William Robinson (JL)
November 15, 2002 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM by William Robinson in support of [98-1] motion to Certify Class and to proceed as a collective action by William Robinson (JL)
November 15, 2002 Filing 98 MOTION by William Robinson to Certify Class and to proceed as a collective action Motion Hearing set for 9:00 12/19/02 (JL)
November 14, 2002 Filing 97 Collective Action Opt-in form adding plaintiff Thomas J. Eisenhauer (JL)
November 13, 2002 Filing 96 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff George E. Decker (JL)
November 6, 2002 Filing 95 Collective Action Opt-in form adding plaintiff Susan Skivington (JL)
November 6, 2002 Filing 94 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Laurie Cuthbert (JL)
November 1, 2002 Filing 93 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Michael Zawacki (JL)
October 31, 2002 Filing 92 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Debby G. Soriano (JL)
October 31, 2002 Filing 91 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Franklin W. Jenks (JL)
October 28, 2002 Filing 90 Collective Action Opt-in form adding plainltiff Shirley P. Vergilia (JL)
October 25, 2002 Filing 89 Collective action opt-in form adding plaintiff Albertha Broyld (JL)
October 25, 2002 Filing 88 Collective Action Opt-in form adding plaintiff Howard Goldstone (JL)
October 25, 2002 Filing 87 Collective Action Opt-in form adding plainltiff Glenn Gebhard (JL)
October 16, 2002 Filing 86 Collective action Opt-in Form adding plaintif David C. Ferrara (JL)
October 16, 2002 Filing 85 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintif Otha Worth (JL)
October 15, 2002 Filing 84 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Donald Roy Clark (JL)
October 15, 2002 Filing 83 Collective Action opt-in Form adding plaintiff James R. Contreras (JL)
October 15, 2002 Filing 82 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Theotis McNair (JL)
October 15, 2002 Filing 81 Collective Action Opt-in form adding plaintiff Glenda M. Videan (JL)
October 11, 2002 Filing 80 Collective Action Opt-in form adding plaintiff Thomas P. Daly (JL)
October 9, 2002 Filing 79 Collective Action Op-in form adding plaintiff Robert W. D'Agostino (BJB)
October 9, 2002 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint by Eastman Kodak (Attorney Stanley J. Matusz, Todd R. Shinaman), (BJB)
October 8, 2002 Filing 74 Collective Action Op-in form adding plaintiff Wayne Turner (BJB)
October 8, 2002 Filing 73 Collective Action Op-in form adding plaintiff Juan A. Moore (BJB)
October 8, 2002 Filing 72 Collective Action Op-in form adding plaintiff Howard B. Davis (BJB)
October 8, 2002 Filing 71 Collective Action Op-in form adding plaintiff Charlie Childs (BJB)
October 4, 2002 Filing 75 Collective Action Op-in form adding plaintiff Michael V. Luddy (BJB)
October 3, 2002 Filing 77 Collective Action Op-in form adding plaintiff Leroy Kendrick (BJB)
October 2, 2002 Filing 76 Collective Action Op-in form adding plaintiff Janusz Muszak (BJB)
October 1, 2002 Filing 70 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Richard L. Baase (JL)
October 1, 2002 Filing 69 Collective Action Op-in form adding plaintiff John W. Smith, Jr. (JL)
September 30, 2002 Filing 68 Collective Action Op-in form adding plaintiff Delores Miller (JL)
September 30, 2002 Filing 67 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Willa D. Williams (JL)
September 30, 2002 Filing 66 Collective Action Opt-in form adding plaintiff John R. Keegan (JL)
September 27, 2002 Filing 65 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Gloria Adams (JL)
September 27, 2002 Filing 64 Collective Action Op-in form adding plaintiff Rosa Lee Thomas (JL)
September 27, 2002 Filing 63 Collective Action Op-in Form adding plaintiff Carol Green (JL)
September 26, 2002 Filing 61 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Clarence Edward Meter Jr. (JL)
September 23, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying [20-1] cross motion to certify a class, denying [20-2] cross motion proceed as a collective action, denying [20-3] cross motion for Summary Judgment, denying [13-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Senior USDJ Michael A. Telesca ) Notice and copy of order sent to Charles W. Rogers, Todd R. Shinaman, Mark Hannabury (JL)
September 23, 2002 Filing 59 Collective Action Opt-in form adding plaintiff Stan Bliss (JL)
September 23, 2002 Filing 58 Collective Action Opt-in form adding plaintiff Albert L. Blair (JL)
September 23, 2002 Filing 57 Collective Action Opt-in form adding Antonio Romero as plaintiff (JL)
September 23, 2002 Filing 56 Collective Action opt-in form adding Gary R. Hillman as plaintiff (JL)
September 20, 2002 Filing 55 Collective Action Opt-in form adding Allan Saunders as plaintiff (JL)
September 19, 2002 Filing 54 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding Karen Paul as plaintiff (JL)
September 18, 2002 Filing 62 Minute entry: on defendant's motion to dismiss; plaintiff's motion to certify class, summary judgment; decision reserved (MAT) (JL)
September 18, 2002 Filing 53 Collective Action Opt-in form adding Charles H. Colf, Jr. as plaintiff (JL)
September 18, 2002 Filing 52 Collective Action Opt-in form adding Craig M. Steves as plaintiff (JL)
September 16, 2002 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM by William Robinson Re: [29-1] miscellaneous response by Eastman Kodak (JL)
September 16, 2002 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT by Scott R. Doran for William Robinson Re: [29-1] miscellaneous response by Eastman Kodak (JL)
September 16, 2002 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT by Willa Dean Williams Re: [29-1] miscellaneous response by Eastman Kodak (JL)
September 16, 2002 Filing 48 STATEMENT OF FACTS by William Robinson (JL)
September 16, 2002 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT by Michelle M. Cook Re: [29-1] miscellaneous response by Eastman Kodak (JL)
September 16, 2002 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT by Emmett Lee Peters Re: [29-1] miscellaneous response by Eastman Kodak (JL)
September 16, 2002 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT by Gerleen Beaty Re: [29-1] miscellaneous response by Eastman Kodak (JL)
September 16, 2002 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT by Susan Klueber Re: [29-1] miscellaneous response by Eastman Kodak (JL)
September 16, 2002 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT by Mary Joy Josefozicz Re: [29-1] miscellaneous response by Eastman Kodak (JL)
September 16, 2002 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT by Frankie M. Washington Re: [29-1] miscellaneous response by Eastman Kodak (JL)
September 16, 2002 Filing 40 REPLY AFFIRMATION by Charles W. Rogers, Esq. for William Robinson Re: [29-1] miscellaneous response by Eastman Kodak (JL)
September 16, 2002 Filing 39 Collective Action Opt-in form adding Catherine Cliff as plaintiff (JL)
September 12, 2002 Filing 37 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding Susan Klueber as plaintiff (JL)
September 11, 2002 Filing 38 Collective Action Opt-in form adding Lenora Carter as plaintiff (JL)
September 11, 2002 Filing 36 Minute entry:, Motion Hearing adjourned to 9/18/02 for [13-1] motion to Dismiss (MAT) (JL)
September 10, 2002 Filing 34 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding Mary Joy Josefozicz as plaintiff (JL) Modified on 09/18/2002
September 10, 2002 Filing 33 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding Douglas A. Schoenweitz as plaintiff (JL)
September 9, 2002 Filing 35 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding plaintiff Frankie M. Washington (JL)
September 6, 2002 Filing 47 collective action opt-in form adding Edward J. Dangler as plaintiff (JL)
September 6, 2002 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM by Eastman Kodak in further support of [13-1] motion to Dismiss by Eastman Kodak (TO)
September 6, 2002 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT by Stanley Matusz attorney for Eastman Kodak in support of [13-1] motion to Dismiss by Eastman Kodak (TO)
September 6, 2002 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT by Joseph Bruno, Senior Compensation Consultant in the Worldwide Total Compensation dept. for Eastman Kodak Re: [20-1] cross motion to certify a class by William Robinson (TO)
September 6, 2002 Filing 29 RESPONSE by Eastman Kodak to [22-1] facts statement by William Robinson and defendant's counterstatment of material facts not in dispute (TO)
September 4, 2002 Filing 28 Collective Action Opt in form adding Michelle M. Cook as plaintiff (JL)
September 4, 2002 Filing 27 Collective Action Opt-in Form adding Scott W. Spring as plaintiff (JL)
September 3, 2002 Filing 24 Collective Action Opt-in form adding James G. Schneider as plaintiff (JL)
August 30, 2002 Filing 26 Collective Action Opt-in form adding Wayne W. Okoniewicz as plaintiff (JL)
August 30, 2002 Filing 25 Collective Action Opt-in form adding Gerleen Beaty as plaintiff (JL)
August 29, 2002 Filing 23 Collective Action Opt In Form as to Roger T. Bowen (JL)
August 14, 2002 Filing 22 STATEMENT OF FACTS by William Robinson [20-1] cross motion to certify a class by William Robinson (JL)
August 12, 2002 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by William Robinson in opposition to [13-1] motion to Dismiss by Eastman Kodak and in support of plaintiff's motion to certify a class and proceed as a collective action and for summary judgment (TO)
August 12, 2002 Filing 20 CROSS MOTION by William Robinson to certify a class , and proceed as a collective action , and for Summary Judgment Motion Hearing set for 9:00 9/18/02 (TO)
August 5, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Mark Hannabury to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Senior USDJ Michael A. Telesca ) Notice and copy of order sent to Charles W. Rogers, Todd R. Shinaman, Mark Hannabury (JL)
August 5, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, granting plaintiff's request to file a brief of 40 pages exclusive of exhibits ( signed by Senior USDJ Michael A. Telesca ) Notice and copy of order sent to Charles W. Rogers, Todd R. Shinaman, Mark Hannabury (JL)
July 29, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Replies to Responses to Motions 9/6/02 ; Responses to Motions to 8/12/02 ; plaintiff's reply papers on its cross motion including any motion to certify will be served by 9/16/02; Oral Argument 9:00 9/18/02 ( signed by Senior USDJ Michael A. Telesca ) Notice and copy of order sent to Charles W. Rogers, Todd R. Shinaman, Mark Hannabury (JL)
July 24, 2002 Filing 17 Minute entry: [7-1] motion to Dismiss - withdrawn (MAT) (JL)
July 22, 2002 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Eastman Kodak in support of [13-1] motion to Dismiss by Eastman Kodak (JL)
July 22, 2002 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT by Joseph Bruno for Eastman Kodak in support of [13-1] motion to Dismiss by Eastman Kodak (JL)
July 22, 2002 Filing 13 MOTION by Eastman Kodak to Dismiss Motion Hearing set for 9:00 7/18/02 (JL)
July 18, 2002 Filing 12 Minute entry:, Motion Hearing set for 9:00 7/24/02 for [7-1] motion to Dismiss (MAT) (JL)
July 16, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, to Withdraw [7-1] motion to Dismiss by Eastman Kodak , to Extend Time , reset Answer deadline to 7/22/02 for Eastman Kodak , set Cross Motions deadline to 7/31/02 , defendant's Response to Motion is due 8/19/02; ; plaintiff's reply papers are due 8/30/02; defendant's motion to dismiss and plaintiff's cross motion will be argued on 9/11/02 at 9:00 am ( signed by Senior USDJ Michael A. Telesca ) Notice and copy of order sent to Charles W. Rogers, Todd R. Shinaman, Mark Hannabury (JL)
June 28, 2002 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT by William Robinson , amending [1-1] complaint (JL)
June 28, 2002 Filing 9 MOTION by William Robinson for Mark Hannabury to Appear Pro Hac Vice court to set return date (JL)
June 5, 2002 Deadline updated; Motion Hearing set for 9:00 7/18/02 for [7-1] motion to Dismiss pursuant to notice (MAT) (JL)
May 31, 2002 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Eastman Kodak in support of [7-1] motion to Dismiss by Eastman Kodak (TO)
May 31, 2002 Filing 7 MOTION by Eastman Kodak to Dismiss Motion Hearing set for 9:30 7/18/02 (TO)
May 20, 2002 Filing 6 Opt in form by William Robinson (JL)
May 6, 2002 Filing 5 Collective Action opt in form adding Jeffery A. Erwin as plaintiff (JL)
May 6, 2002 Filing 4 Collective action opt in form adding plaintiff Emmett Lee Peters (JL)
May 6, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION and ORDER, to Extend Time , reset Answer deadline to 5/31/02 for Eastman Kodak signed by Senior USDJ Michael A. Telesca . Notice and copy of order sent to Charles W. Rogers, Todd Shinaman . (JL)
April 15, 2002 Filing 2 RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Eastman Kodak 4/11/02 Answer due on 5/1/02 for Eastman Kodak re:[1-1] complaint (JL)
April 11, 2002 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 62840 (JL)
April 11, 2002 SUMMONS(ES) issued for Eastman Kodak (JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson, et al v. Eastman Kodak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence T Heinsler
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Ellis
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L. Braden
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon P. Rask, Jr.
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Morales
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin W. Jenks
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie H. Thulin
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Nelson
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D Belmont
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett R Boyken
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda A Riley
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan R Burkis
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott D Swan
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila D. Crews-Noye
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca A Goerke
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen L. Korn
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Housel
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Mack
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Rowles
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William S. Wetmore
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanford B Hoffman
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward N Cecchino
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B Civitello
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Foy
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim L. Calloway
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda D Jiacobbe
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Britton
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri J. Utter
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David F. Conger
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory K Walker
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha D Fernberg
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenora Carter
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas A. McPherson
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott B Keir
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Boles
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah E Lively
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Kowalczyk, Jr
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald A Kuehne
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Fenner
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail L Barrett
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia M. Pearce
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Monds
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul S. Kuchman
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis A. Selden
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fancy S VanHoose
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert G Pritchard
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip M Rosini
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Civita M Bronco
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenio Alvarez
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany L Lysiak
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph L Liccione
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Johnson
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen M Rodak
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn P Corke, Sr
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmelo Furgiuele
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra J Popowych
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma W Gilman
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerrard F Price
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric L. Schultz
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Demmert
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon L Weins
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis L Gray
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dona J Jackson
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R Haight
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee A Petralia
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary S Fiske
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W. Johnson
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian E Ross
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Richardson
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R Thomas
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry L Ridley
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet R Truesdale
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Kendrick
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni M Baker
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A White
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooksie M Hall
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin L Farress
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank M Provo
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter G. Osborn
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent M Kurinskas
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halil Binici
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence J Vanderlee
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis W Larson
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda J. Anderson
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Maddalena
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard J. Ryan
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L Lux
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Wellborn, Jr
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Tate
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Gill
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Vazquez
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Torres
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie L Cuyler
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thad H Smith
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Cullerton
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A Young
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R Gray
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith F. Nasca
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward A. Mager
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Blake
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G Monnier
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleo Butts
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jadwiga Howard
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D LeBerth
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark W Woodruff
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Jones
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale W Giddings
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Flemings
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence E Meyer
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Mahone, Jr
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis L Corsi, Jr
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil R Wamser
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T Butler
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul F Bato
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel F Graham
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon C Markus
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan K Pulvino
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenia M Bradley
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alethia M Moore
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth C Wahlers
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd L Colburn
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe A Latimer
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald L Jackett
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Bradley
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald A. Andrychuk
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis J. Broyld
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine L Zukaitis
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Sugrue
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce M Flowers
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ippolito Cardella
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Nelson
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L Linza
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul D. Omeara
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Heard
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph P Kernaghan
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph P. Uttaro
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas E. Drake
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Y Wright
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A Ward
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Michael Simoni
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimble DuBoise
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria J Frisone
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vlade R Endulovski
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen C Marano
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard R Bauer
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray T Mann
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig T Mollon
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Ayala
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gertrude T Phillips
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audry A Malcolm
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Magioncalda
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty A DiPonzio
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L Robinson
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Escobar
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon J Burnam
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie L. Carter
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrek Barksdale
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H Gibson
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward G Pehta
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald F Kuchman
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Lomnick
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dill
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H Zachman
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Anderson
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Waller
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes L Terrance
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julieann Perez Parrish
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith A Lynch
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Davis
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Markus
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick L Sabatini
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher A Harris
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara S Randolph
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W Gage
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E Klender
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karleen E. Ladue
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A Sill, Jr
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny T Gell
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Jaskulski
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L Morris
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Taylor
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David F. Momot
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J McCulloch
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaVerne Harden
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Smith
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn M DeMott
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia A Valder
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C Minnie
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Dann
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory S Hart
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theotis McNair
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Sliker
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M Vink
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie F Simmons
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E. Schmanke
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Capestany
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheree A Colson
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L Fonda
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew M McGill
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard F. Hasselberg
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Contreras
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James S Knapp
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul C. Tennity
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfred E Dicker
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Long
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin T Hurley
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R Zona
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suez E. Elmore
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E Gabel
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman B Carter
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna L James
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley P. Vergilia
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine D Ranieri
Represented By: Charles W. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers |