Lovett v. Eaches et al

Plaintiff: Kelvin Lovett
Defendant: Jeremy Eaches, Fri, Cooper, Robertson, John Doe, Jane Doe, Harold Bell and J Chinn
Case Number: 1:2017cv00757
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: LUCAS
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2018 48 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 41 & 46 MOTIONS for leave to amend the complaint be Denied in part insofar as plaintiff seeks to add O'Conner, Lewis, Thornhill, Tackett, Little, Swords, Hay, Jones, Buckler, and McCoy as defen dants in place of the John/Jane Doe defendants. It is Ordered that defendants' 39 MOTION for leave to depose plaintiff is Granted with the conditions stated in this Order. Plaintiff's 40 MOTION to withdraw his motion to compel is Gran ted. Plaintiff's 39 MOTION to compel is Denied as moot. Plaintiff's 44 MOTION for appointment of counsel is Denied. Plaintiff's 40 MOTION to amend the complaint to add c/o Denny as a defendant is Granted. Plaintiff's [41 ] & 46 MOTIONS to amend the complaint to add named defendants in place of the John Doe defendants is Granted in part. Plaintiff is granted leave to add Joshua Leesburg and S. Bennet as defendants. Plaintiff shall have (30) days from the date of t his Order to submit an amended complaint that adds c/o Denney, Leesburg and Bennet as defendants and to submit completed summons and USM Service forms for service of process on each of these three defendants to the Clerk of Court for the Southern Dis trict of Ohio. Plaintiff's 43 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is Denied as moot. (Objections to the Report & Recommendation are due within (14) days). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/11/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified on 10/11/2018 (art).
August 22, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 19 Report and Recommendations, denying 11 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/22/18. (jlm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 20, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 29 Motion to Appoint Counsel, and denying plaintiff's 29 Motion to Compel/motion for appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/20/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 18, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 11 MOTION for Default Judgment be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 5/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/18/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovett v. Eaches et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Eaches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Chinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?