Westreicher et al v. United States Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Elizabeth Westreicher and Erick Ronald Westreicher Flores
Defendant: Chad Wolf, Mark Hansen, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Julie Decker, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, William Barr, Director, USCIS, District Director, District 12 of the USCIS, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Director, Cincinnati, Ohio Field Office of the USCIS and United States Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2020cv00191
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bryan King, II for Defendants Director, Cincinnati, Ohio Field Office of the USCIS, Director, USCIS, District Director, District 12 of the USCIS, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Attorney General (King, William)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kathryn Elizabeth Westreicher, Erick Ronald Westreicher Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 -- Birth Cert, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 -- Passport, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 -- NOID (1-11-16), #4 Exhibit Ex 4 -- NOID (3-1-10), #5 Exhibit Ex 5 -- Decision (4-12-10), #6 Exhibit Ex 6 -- BIA Decision (5-26-11), #7 Exhibit Ex 7 -- NOID (9-18-13), #8 Exhibit Ex 8 -- Decision (11-8-13), #9 Exhibit Ex 9 -- BIA Decision (12-5-17), #10 Exhibit Ex 10 -- Marriage Cert (Katie), #11 Exhibit Ex 11 -- decision (8-4-16), #12 Exhibit Ex 12 -- BIA decision (12-5-17 Katie), #13 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Updated Civil Cover Sheet) (Somers, Blake) Modified docket text on 3/17/2020 (eh).
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Director, Cincinnati, Ohio Field Office of the USCIS, Director, USCIS, District Director, District 12 of the USCIS, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, and United States Attorney General. (bjc)
March 6, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Julie Decker, Mark Hansen, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7367430), filed by Erick Ronald Westreicher Flores, Kathryn Elizabeth Westreicher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -- Birth Certificate, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 -- Passport, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 -- NOID (1-11-16), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 -- NOID (3-1-10), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 -- Decision (4-12-10), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 -- BIA Decision (5-26-11), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 -- NOID (9-18-13), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 -- Decision (11-8-13), #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 -- BIA Decision (12-5-17), #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 -- Marriage Cert (Katie), #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 -- decision (8-4-16), #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 -- BIA decision (12-5-17 Katie), #13 Summons Form Summons to Barr, #14 Summons Form Summons to Cuccinelli, #15 Summons Form Summons to Decker, #16 Summons Form Summons to Hansen, #17 Summons Form Summons to USCIS, #18 Summons Form Summons to Wolf, #19 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Somers, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westreicher et al v. United States Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Elizabeth Westreicher
Represented By: Blake Paul Somers
Represented By: Stephenie Lape Wolfinbarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Ronald Westreicher Flores
Represented By: Blake Paul Somers
Represented By: Stephenie Lape Wolfinbarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: William Bryan King, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, USCIS
Represented By: William Bryan King, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director, District 12 of the USCIS
Represented By: William Bryan King, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: William Bryan King, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Cincinnati, Ohio Field Office of the USCIS
Represented By: William Bryan King, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Represented By: William Bryan King, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?