Goode et al v. Nuance Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Goode, Connie Christensen, Debora T Newman, Sidne L Kneeland, Kristine Bartlett, Terryl Wood, Jayme Stewart, Margaret E Nieman, Tracy L Hicks, Shawnee Newman, Melanie M Tepp, Barbara Jean Rasmussen, Erica Flinn, Nancy Toth, Kathleen F Keane, Sally Clough, Holly Thomas, Christine Molnar, Marie A Plum, Janelle Gawarecki, Beth R Hopper, Sandra DeGroot, Lynn P Donnell, Judith Scanlon, Susan E Gevaart, Annette Flores, Heather Gatheridge, Royann Marshall, Janelle M Hegrenes, Sallie Bellows, Shirley Nicholson, Denise R Scott, Cynthia Walker, Dorene Hammons, Christie Holby, Saundra L Garrett, Cherie L McCann, Saundra A Mulkey, Valerie E Odom, Christine M Benard, Sheila Blyth, Cindy A Biro, Theresa Chodkiewicz, Tonya Rohrbaugh, Margaret E Craig, Andrea Garrett, Marjorie K Delzeit, Bonnie Theis, Julie Lynn Pindell, Sheila M Johnson, Mary Ann Makay-Poland, Pamela J Stiffler, Susanne Carlson, Laine Goulooze, Louise A Jobe, Jody L Daedlow, Mary Ann Meier, Deborah J Land, Susan Riggan, Tracey Lumley, Nikki V Cormier, Dara Thompson, Julie M Powers, Kathy Delory, Kristie L LeValley, Michelle L Helffrich, Yvonne Lawrence, Sherry L Sherry, Jennifer Whipp, Rhonda Sutton, Karyn A Menke, Tonya DeKruger, Connie Horton, Aileen Lengyel, Sherryll Beach, Shannon L Crist, Maryann Makaypoland, Gina L Steinbarger, Serena M Leight, Pamela K Lovelace, Dianna M Snyder, Susan Ikpoh, Kristin E Niel, Esther Rumfelt, Kathy Pipich, Nancy J Brodeur, Linda Nitzschke, Meagan E Jaegers, Pamela M Hannan, Kathi L Dean, Jane M Sebek, Jennifer Hunter, Laura Thurnes, Carla J McIntyre, Deborah Benjamin, Laura Hampton, Kara Hillard, Candace Wilcox, Joyce Ratajczak, Valerie A Krampetz, Minerva Cuellar, Venita Gauna, Carrie Moore, Miriam L Norton, Angela D Williams, Renee Baker, Jannell Tardif, Martha A Carson, Dena Flynn, Carla M Halkias, Beth A Ellis, Kelly Crowell, Kelly R Hannah, Kelly Shellenberger, Dana Brown, Cathy E Palovcsik, Tammy L Schultz, Debra Jenkins, Marla Weiss, M Susan Cunningham, Elizabeth Scharnhorst, Maria J Smith, Kelly A Shields, Maureen E Daly Schafer, Beth C Burton, Shelley L Pampanin, Allison Shelley, Donna Schwanz, Linda Ertel, Kristen M Jacobsen, Arletta J Oriani, Emily Schepel, Helen Niccum, Shannon Woodhall, Shannon L Castle, Nancy J Boyer, Margaret Hoerst Pether, Marcia Mauch, Sandra Lee, Kimberly Naparstek, Vicky McClure, Pauline A Turner, Marilyn Spargrove, Maureen Johnson, Tracy Magnuson, Elaine Segura, Gena Rusnak, Nancy Skipper, Jane M Sparkowich, Misty D Moore, Lorraine K Long, Roxane Mackey, Michelle M Dean, Daniel T Brenneman, Lynette Gullett, Laura Jeneine Bond, Cheryl Atwood, Jana H Slatton, Velma Wilkerson, Lisa Kidwell, Susan K Tippen, Sharon Simpson, Kelly Webb Drummond, Vanessa L Johnson, Jessica D Miller, Melinda H Walsh, Pamela Louise Morgan, Anne Yvonne Padilla, Patricia L Emery, Yvette Barrientes, Denise Hostetler, Laura M Allen, Laurie Ertz, Fidela V Agado, Meryl Anderson, Deborah Lynn Welzien, Nedra Robinson, Lizabeth Knight, Jane Guido, Dianna L Barnett, Jo Ellen Carnes, Susan Travis, Trina M Dyer, Christi A Tapella, Judith B Hammond, Margaret E Storms, Susan Spaulding, Margit Davis, Tina D Pratt, Pamela Van Schaick, Dawn McPeak, Brenda Wynn, Mildred Ann McDaniels, Kathy G Gregg, Jacqueline M Brown, Candace Mack, Betty Kimble, Michelle Knight, Gail L Lairmore, Amy L Clark, Stacy McCurdy, Tracy Jones, Lora B Baker, Karen M Lenke, Dana Haugen, Nickida Scott, Nancy Phillips, Karen Burke, Bonnie Hernandez, Shelley M Snyder, Gail Young, Amy Bruce, Amy Greene, Mary Dean, Jennifer Marble, Carla Vincent, Janet Coffman, Karen D Fletcher, Marla Kim Smith, Tracy Getz, Anjana Sharma, Gaila Vanderpool, Amy I Klingenberger, Patricia C Solari, Paula Clinton, Jacqueline J Schule, Pamela A Folz, Lori A Drinkwater, Mechele Stykes, Nicole S Mann, Jenny Peters, Carol P O'Neill, Rhonda D Christian, Lora Baker, Cheryl Ferris, Lori D Kirkwood, Cathy A Tournoux, Mary Parsley, Violet D Branson, Bonnie L Spaulding, Kristine Crawford, Kimberley Richardson, Marcy R Brown Thomas, Laurie Carr, Terri L Booth, Catherine Kleve, Marianna Pinello, Migdalia Silvestros, Krista Rizzo, Lois M Webb, Angela Thilges, Ann Wittler, Diana Cox, Janie R Conroy, Jeanine R Hurley, Pamela M McCord, Gloria C Hubbard, Deborah G Gause, Vicki Adams, Donna F Nichols, Dawn Smith, Juliana Cifaldi, Delores C Taylor, Donna Lunsford, Jacqueline Schule, Jonathan G Mitchell, Virginia Salisbury, Brenda M Barker, Jean A Munier, Donna M Beltz, Margaret Larose, Jennifer Cavalet, Stephanie DePoma, Kim Bradley, Beth Hluszti, Ann Palacios, Carol A Casner, Beverly K Yow, Samantha Siegfried, Cassandra J Dunbar, Mary K Ellis, Norma E Dulac, Jill M Lopez, Elvira Hurd, Allison A Boice, Terri L Michl-Brummer, Christine Baxter, Sheree Strid, Susan K Schrader, Susan Sharifie, Susan E Wrisley, Lorraine Long, Linda A Halladay, Vera Lyne Ward, Carla F Boyd, Karen E Ledbetter, Margaret E Turk, Ann Mitchell, Kathy Staude, Laurie T Gremonprez, Audrey R Sheffield, Dina R Di Dio, Dawn Y Tieffenbacher, Susan Snyder, Traci L Dean, Kerry M Brown Peters, Janet Passano, Marsha Kradle, April Wall, Joanne Meyer, Terrie Johnson, Laurie Cugino, Deborah S Boudreau, Sherry Yvonne Martin, Stacy Jo Gerner, Jolinda Furguiele, Karen M Aureli, Darlene M Fowler, Christine A Troutman, Susan Weathersby, Patrice L Dixon, Glenna S Lundquist, Sue M Wike, Selena V Reidworrell, Linda M Kalbac, Brenda W Blake, Linda Kessler, Monica A Frye, Kindra L Slater, Kay Fahlbusch, Marie Cain, Cheryl Martin, Cyndl Moore, Kathleen Leach, Laurie Cranfield, Betty Danielson, Julia L Irwin, Cathy Vallee, Jaede L Quint, Susan G Travis, Michelle Manzo, Katherine White, Sandra L Clark, Heather Clemmons, Cammie Stralko, Diane Gibas, Melissa D White, Sharon Brooks, Edelwisa Elomina, Linda A Thomas, Eleanor Jean Tokarski, Catherine Harrington, Elaina Rande, Jill Belzer, Bonnie L Allison, Kishan Desai, Sharon Boody Dean, Judith K Taggart, Debbie Sandall, Kandi Frey, Lorrie Taylor, Narlayne J Vaclavik, Anne Jacobs, Sherry L Deloatch, Margaret E Mackey, Carol A Jolin, Brenda J Rushe, Debra J Reneau, Valerie Cook, Penny L Payton, Susie Rivera, Barbara L Smith, Deborah Leas, Cynthia Faust, Denise Marie McDonald, Lisa Simmons, Melanie N Spendlove, Stacey McDaniel, Linda Hagen, Cathy Sipes-Rich, Lisa Cunningham, Janet Varey, Peggy Nell Mangieri, Stacey L Grazier, Kathy Chapin, Linda Seevers, Cheryl L Klein, Virginia M Mize, Mary E Sorbara, Susan D Brosnahan, Carla S Crow, Karen F Sedeski, Mary R Morningstar, Janice Reardon, John H Howard, Tessa Conaway, Catherine Chmura, Susan Hare, Marianne Tolley, Debra L Lugo, Janice A Baldwin, Darlene D Neal, Samantha Heinemann, George Backalukas, Traci M Muchler, Pamela L Cox, Sherry L Montgomery, David McKearney, Ruth L Tayson, Kathy L Graves, Hope Taylor, Dorothy A Elliott, Amanda L Gavorek, Robynne P Cornell, Mary Ann Braunbeck, Danielle M Hardesty, Patricia A Denehy, Jennifer Strohl, Judith D'Angelo, Jonell A Pope, Rhonda Cobb, Yvonne Marie Bair, Gabriel K Thomas, Roger Glasko, Pamela A McKinnon, Tara Jirak, Theresa Wharton, Jo Ann Piner, Edward E Peterson, Kimberly Eliashuk, Dana McHargue, Linda Lloyd, Vicki Bunch, Geraldine L Mathes, Linda Schermerhorn, Barbara J Brownson, Gayla R Bryant, Michelle W Register, Julian F Clift, Karen M Aldeman, Kim N Dent, Judith L Weaks, Sarah J Carter, Nancy A Dean, Celeste Bates, Cheryl Beauchamp, Robin D Barefoot, Heidi Bettis, Nancy K Skipper, Mary E Swanson, Darla K Collins, Renee T Long, Cheryl Saylor, Barbara Jansky, Suzan Cousino, Jean Baez, Lori A Mazonas, Elisa Palmer, Rachel B Rosenberger, Jeanne C Bell, Louise A Long, Karen Carruthers, Kathy Quigley, Melody Campbell, Janice Matthews, Barbara D Boyd, Lisa S Parker, Charlene Clements, Deborah J Adams, Diana R Biro, Ann Marie Deitch, Sue Terry, Lisa J Parrish, Maureen A Stallone, Connie L Baldwin, Vivian W Freppon, Jacqueline Nicholson, Cynthia S McGinley, Brenda L Hoogasian, Leslie Griffis, Dorita Brooks, Holly C Thomas, Marie Peacock, Kristine K Bartels, JoJenna J L Shumate, Errin Moore, Deborah M Foster, Michelle Myers, Jeannine T Sheehan, Stephanie Curran, Amanda Matchett, Jacqueline Guynn, Cynthia Staake, Brentz Catherine Robinson, Annette M Watson, Charles E Benson, Sr, Susan Schmidt, Sherrie Buress, Lisa Ayala, Sarah Dafler, Teresa L Mills, April Youngblood, Sharyn Bastiani, Carol A Glidden, Deana Strauss, Lisa A Flanagan, Karen S Dale, Gina C Henderson, Karen M Kush, Laura A Hodge, Tonya Mardis Ashcom, Lisa D Weis, Kashonda T Mitchell, Penny K Dennis, Joann L Clapacs, Sherri L Gault, Theresa A Slaughter, Holly Flores, Lonette S Worthey, Pamela Dee Ragsdale, Tracy Reilly, Susan Teggatz, Patricia Zeleznik, Barbara Bissonnette, Melissa Adelson, Dolores O'Grady, Kimberly A Styons, Nancy C Pruett, Ruth M Conley, Paula True, Rebecca S Ells, Christa J Lima, Linda L Moment, Linda Wright, Doreen Whittaker, Judith Casey, Ryan Harding, Kelley Gray, Carmen Tucker, Michelle Walters, Lisa M Funston, Sandra Stein, Tamika Wilson, Vickie Blakeman, Johanna N Billups, Marcia Mueller, Lori Adam, Sandra J Sweeny, Steven A Colten, Tammy L Sikora, Emily Andrews, Beverly L Waldrup, Cynthia W Mills, Carolyn J Sawyer, Gail M Corliss, Theresa A Gaspar, Cynthia Steward, Danna K Frazier, Chelsea Vaquero, Wendy S Bouchillon, Karen M Letavish, Christie Wilson, Marsha Dowling, Jill D Gould, James Burton, Marion Di Scenza, Carol O'Connor, Tracy Watkins, Vanessa Leavitt, Gail Hutton, Carol McGruder, Brandy Garrett, Melissa E Rouse, Linda J Palmisino, Sandra A Arnold, Sandra LaCroix, Elaina Marie Rande, Susan R Aitken, Belinda Blackburn, Kerri A Kadrmas, Kimberly Fairchild, Saundra S Scarlett, Elizabeth Carter, Kathy A Thomas, Pamela K Wood, Susan Noreen Mullaney, Stephanie Merrington, Lea Mendoza, Sharon K Mallory, Eve M Bennett, Renee Hinkle, Karen Jorgensen, Barbara A Michaud, Kristina M Dougherty, Mary C Quade, Theresa M Crane, Patsy R Phipps, Delores F Marcus, Eva C Russell, Ruth M Carnahan, Betty T Durrett, Nancy Weidenhamer, Marguerite A Ovellette, Donna J Mayer, Jennifer J Hunter, Linda Ann Maiullo, Sheryl Doggett, Laura Shockey, Laurie M Cranfield, Sherry L Stewart, Elizabeth A Nelson, Linda J Grant, Mary Jane Martin, Elizabeth J Champagne, Julie Rogers, Susan Pittman, Christine Troutman, Kristina Johnson, Melinda Nunez, Pamela A Posthauer, Jessica M Baney, Marilee Hill, Donna B Armentrout, Sharon V Kays, Melissa J Adelson, Norma James, Donna Mary Palmer, Rene D Bain, Anissa Jeffers, Patricia French, Janette E Petersen, Donna J Fowler, Angela Muhammad, Marla Sloan, Janine S Mitchell, Debra R Friess, Marta K Turner, Patricia Emery, Susan R Bohn, Cynthia Mowers, Catherine D Glenn, Patricia Unversaw, Donna Smith, Esther Chaney Baker, Candace L Pitchford, Karla Ashline, Kristina Scalone, Patricia Gomez, Victoria Gordon, Beverly R Woods, Linda Boatwright, Gina M Romero, Billie Jan Arceneaux, Lisa E Diede, Deborah N Autry, Camille Jackson, Deborah A Calendine, Teresa Eschenburg, Linda M Woodson, Arlene E Howard, Lisa Slechta, Roseanne H Trela, Laura Swift, Linda A Ruffin, Donna M Kristofik, Sheila McCune, Penny D Rachiell, Lisa A Gilbert, Colleen Sullivan, Michelle Patti, Lois A Sturino, Ellen M Lemanski, Doreen Hughes, Diana Gottke, Dollie Davis, Sandra L Schoenke, Jody Dovin, Wendy S Chase, Rita D Snead, Nina Aldridge, Theresa Sheppard, Ashley Collins, Susan Evans, Sharon A Jones, Gwen C Parkman, Laura B Bridges, Ronica A Brown, Joanne Drury, Jolene T Drake, Danielle Y Fugate, Deborah J Geiman, Rebecca J Noell, Audre E Hein, Denise C Bishop, Kristi L Mongan, Deborah A Jones, Sabrina Scoggin, Linda Goodfellow, Angela L Smith, Lisa Thomason, Debra G Fisher, Judy Adcock, Madeline Louise Dressler, Margaret E Foltz, Patricia Keel, Rebecca S Elliott, Cerena D Kovach, Dawn M Harrell, Margaret A Hagerty, Denise A Pinckney, Michelle Hensen, Brenda McIntosh, Janice Coe, Dianne Vogl, Patricia M Powers, Susan H Arthur, Jennifer R Hood, Gladys Foster, Magdalena Ruelas, Sheila Szafranski, Colbi Ewing, Louise M Guhman, Lisa Donatelli, Wilma J Turner, April D Anderson, Janice S Smith, Deborah A Perri, Amy McManus, Phyllis D Barnes, Valree M Creed, Linda G Clanton, Karen L Buskness, Dawn Brewer, Lynn F Lastinger, Barbara A Hasson Brown, Lisa R Ware, Christine Kuranishi, Gale Taylor, Theresa L Eckerson, Teresa C Bundrum, Kathi Kendall, Jeannine Lowe, Marguerite English, Cora Johnston, Tammy Banks, Joseph B Linson, Sheila Oliver, Levice Margie McAtee, Diana Lauper, Susan J Robertson, Rebecca Woodard, Suzanne Johnson, Cynthia Zoltek, Sherry Whispell, Nancy J Fitch, Vickie Jordan, Tammy Carol Hale, Roxanne Dupuis, Randi Morgan, Sandra M Wilson, Sharon Bell, Teresa M Masse, Lynette McDevitt, Kristy K Keller, Christina Tice, Teresa Y Wright, Elizabeth Ann Webber, Cathy Flores, Angela Prantl, Debbie L Holth, Gloria A Staples, Catherine Martin, Kathleen D Kelley, Donna Biagini, Denise A Patton, Cathy A McCully, Melissa A Post, Amy Clay, Jameson Baudelaire, Allison F Warn, Danita J Vest, JoAnne J Warren, Susan Duncan, Julia A Skrypzak, Cathy S LeFils, Alice R Estrada, Christine Infelise, Laura Roberts, Charlotte Karwatske, Sandra Hathaway, Carole L Burns, Maureen Hahn, Yulneka Brown, Mary Furciniti, Janet F Davis, Cristi Lee Butte, Sandra G Sheridan, Leona R Payne, Carolyn Miles, Emi Pilant, Cathy Woy, Patsy Sewell, Adrienne J Winand, Karen Broussard, Andrea J Venuto, Keri Holtsclaw, Sara Mattison, Charles Curtiss, Wendy M Blankenship, Lisa Marie Mullaney, Jeanne L Wallace, Brenda Serafino, Sonya M Sutherland, Emilie Iezzi, Shelly Marie Gaul, Sharon N Kaplan, Frances Kimball, Shelley Falk, Theresa Stevens, Beth M Cottrell, Judy Taylor, Sandy Rector, Amy J Brace, Sue Hoesing, Carol D Pecena, Monica Scott, Gilberta M Iorg, Nichole M Lavely, Michelle Witt, Daurice Dezonia, Marcela C DeBano, Amy Varnum, Edes Page, Teri L Eriksen, Bonnie K Brenneman, Darren E Hayes, Jennifer Gardner, Holly A Fair, Sarah Lavergne, Kimberly L Byers, Dana Poteet, Maria Ann Flack, Diane M Signorelli, Brittany Presslor, Patricia A Nading, Terri L Hemmah, Susan Derooy, Michelle Ouelette, Susan C Poindexter, Kristen Anderson, Etta F Young, Michelle L Kinkead, Darlene Hipps, Jessica Harvey, Monica Ramsey, Kimberly J Stevens, Patricia M Kline, Eva J Cupka, Michelle Scott, Cindy J Toole, Traci Perdue, Lenora Wozniak, Tania L Petry, Linda J Caliendo, J Michele Pocius, Kathleen Rutledge, Jeanne Valanzola, Patricia A Lane, Debbie L Ryan, Jamie N Kutzer, Kelly N Castle, Susan D Valdez, Rita Tibbs, Barbara Thornton, Frances K O'Neil, Patricia K Palmer, Jolottie S Sweatmon, Lucia E Espinosa, Toni Blaes and Rosi M Weitzel
Defendant: Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc., Transcend Services and Transolutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv00472
Filed: August 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Rogers
Presiding Judge: X
Referring Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
2 Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #104 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions AndOpposed MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Expedited Motion for Sanctions or to Compel Discovery Responses by Opt-Ins] ) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. ; (Thrutchley, Christopher)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne ; granting #107 Motion for Leave to File Document(s) (Re: #104 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions AndOpposed MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Expedited Motion for Sanctions or to Compel Discovery Responses by Opt-Ins] ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kah, Chambers)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Jayne (Re: #107 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions or to Compel Discovery Responses by Opt-Ins ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
September 3, 2019 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions or to Compel Discovery Responses by Opt-Ins (Re: 105 Minute Order,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, #104 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions AndOpposed MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Expedited Motion for Sanctions or to Compel Discovery Responses by Opt-Ins], #106 Response in Opposition to Motion, ) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Thrutchley, Christopher)
August 29, 2019 Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #104 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions AndOpposed MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Expedited Motion for Sanctions or to Compel Discovery Responses by Opt-Ins] ) by Jennifer Goode, Kandi Frey(individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated) ; (Smolen, Daniel)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne Plaintiffs are ordered to respond to Defendants' Expedited Motion for Sanctions or to Compel Discovery Responses by Opt-Ins (ECF No. 104) on an expedited basis and no later than one week from the date of this Order, or by Friday, August 30, 2019. No reply shall be permitted unless ordered by the Court, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 8/30/2019) (Re: #104 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions AndOpposed MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Expedited Motion for Sanctions or to Compel Discovery Responses by Opt-Ins] ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
August 22, 2019 ***Motion(s) Referred to Magistrate Judge Jayne (Re: #104 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions AndOpposed MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Expedited Motion for Sanctions or to Compel Discovery Responses by Opt-Ins] ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 104 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions And, Opposed MOTION to Compel [Defendants' Expedited Motion for Sanctions or to Compel Discovery Responses by Opt-Ins] by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (With attachments) (Thrutchley, Christopher)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Motion to Supplement Notice of Conditional Certification to Seven Individuals) ; granting #102 Motion to Supplement (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 4, 2019 Filing 102 Joint MOTION to Supplement Notice of Conditional Certification to Seven Individuals by Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (With attachments) (Massey, Hillary)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne ; granting #99 Motion for Protective Order (sdc, Dpty Clk)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Amended Class Certification Scheduling Order) ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 9/23/2019, Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2019 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2020 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #98 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 1, 2019 Filing 99 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Kandi Frey(individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jennifer Goode (With attachments) (Smith, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 98 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #55 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s), ) by Kandi Frey(individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jennifer Goode (With attachments) (Smith, Mark)
February 5, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE Attorney's Lien for Fees and Costs by Kandi Frey(individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jennifer Goode (Smolen, Donald)
January 21, 2019 Filing 96 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dennis Albert Caruso on behalf of Kandi Frey(individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Jennifer Goode [Note: Attorney Dennis Albert Caruso added to party Kandi Frey(pty:pla), Attorney Dennis Albert Caruso added to party Kandi Frey(pty:pla), Attorney Dennis Albert Caruso added to party Jennifer Goode(pty:pla), Attorney Dennis Albert Caruso added to party Jennifer Goode(pty:pla).] (Caruso, Dennis)
January 21, 2019 Filing 95 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Allen Smith on behalf of Kandi Frey, Jennifer Goode [Note: Attorney Mark Allen Smith added to party Kandi Frey(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Allen Smith added to party Kandi Frey(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Allen Smith added to party Jennifer Goode(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Allen Smith added to party Jennifer Goode(pty:pla).] (Smith, Mark)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating attorney Laura L Hamilton and Donald Eugene Smolen, II ; granting #93 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 6, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Donald E. Smolen, II, and Laura L. Hamilton by Kandi Frey(individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Kandi Frey, Jennifer Goode (Smolen, Donald)
December 19, 2018 Filing 92 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hillary J Massey on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Massey, Hillary)
December 19, 2018 Filing 91 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Barry J Miller on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Miller, Barry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 90 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Katherine E Perrelli on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Perrelli, Katherine)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating attorney Larsa K Ramsini; Celine Chan and Gary D Friedman ; granting #88 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 14, 2018 Filing 88 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Gary D. Friedman, Celine J. Chan, and Larsa K. Ramsini of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Russell, John)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating attorney David Arthur Warta ; granting #85 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting admission pro hac vice for attorneys Katherine E. Perrelli, Barry J. Miller, and Hillary J. Massey ; granting #82 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #83 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #84 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 30, 2018 Filing 85 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) David A. Warta by Jennifer Goode (Warta, David)
November 28, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION for Attorney(s) Hillary J. Massey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1986279) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (With attachments) (Russell, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION for Attorney(s) Barry J. Miller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1986278) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (With attachments) (Russell, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 82 MOTION for Attorney(s) Katherine E. Perrelli to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1986277) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (With attachments) (Russell, John)
November 1, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Dawn Brewer, Rebecca J Noell, Monica Scott, Julia A Skrypzak, Janice S Smith, Rosi M Weitzel [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Dawn Brewer, Rebecca J Noell, Monica Scott, Julia A Skrypzak, Janice S Smith, Rosi M Weitzel(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
October 29, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Janice Coe, Holly A Fair, Cathy Flores, Gladys Foster, Lisa A Gilbert, Linda Goodfellow, Sue Hoesing, Patricia M Kline, Christine Kuranishi, Michelle Ouelette, Angela Prantl, Sandy Rector, Brenda Serafino, Sandra M Wilson [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Janice Coe, Holly A Fair, Cathy Flores, Gladys Foster, Lisa A Gilbert, Linda Goodfellow, Sue Hoesing, Patricia M Kline, Christine Kuranishi, Michelle Ouelette, Angela Prantl, Sandy Rector, Brenda Serafino, Sandra M Wilson (pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
October 24, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Nina Aldridge, April D Anderson, Susan H Arthur, Toni Blaes, Teresa C Bundrum, Cristi Lee Butte, Linda J Caliendo, Beth M Cottrell, Marcela C DeBano, Daurice Dezonia, Madeline Louise Dressler, Theresa L Eckerson, Mary Furciniti, Maureen Hahn, Jessica Harvey, Sandra Hathaway, Michelle Hensen, Deborah A Jones, Sharon A Jones, Charlotte Karwatske, Frances Kimball, Catherine Martin, Teresa M Masse, Sheila McCune, Amy McManus, Kristi L Mongan, Susan Noreen Mullaney, Frances K O'Neil, Lisa J Parrish, Michelle Patti, Magdalena Ruelas, Sabrina Scoggin, Rita D Snead, Theresa Stevens, Colleen Sullivan, Judy Taylor, Lisa Thomason, Danita J Vest, Allison F Warn, Sherry Whispell, Etta F Young [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Nina Aldridge, April D Anderson, Susan H Arthur, Toni Blaes, Teresa C Bundrum, Cristi Lee Butte, Linda J Caliendo, Beth M Cottrell, Marcela C DeBano, Daurice Dezonia, Madeline Louise Dressler, Theresa L Eckerson, Mary Furciniti, Maureen Hahn, Jessica Harvey, Sandra Hathaway, Michelle Hensen, Deborah A Jones, Sharon A Jones, Charlotte Karwatske, Frances Kimball, Catherine Martin, Teresa M Masse, Sheila McCune, Amy McManus, Kristi L Mongan, Susan Noreen Mullaney, Frances K O'Neil, Lisa J Parrish, Michelle Patti, Magdalena Ruelas, Sabrina Scoggin, Rita D Snead, Theresa Stevens, Colleen Sullivan, Judy Taylor, Lisa Thomason, Danita J Vest, Allison F Warn, Sherry Whispell, Etta F Young (pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
October 19, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Kristen Anderson, Tammy Banks, Jameson Baudelaire, Amy Clay, Carla S Crow, Lisa Donatelli, Teri L Eriksen, Margaret E Foltz, Danielle Y Fugate, Jennifer Gardner, Shelly Marie Gaul, Deborah J Geiman, Darren E Hayes, Keri Holtsclaw, Cerena D Kovach, Patricia A Lane, Sarah Lavergne, Jeannine Lowe, Brenda McIntosh, Carolyn Miles, Sheila Oliver, Edes Page, Leona R Payne, Carol D Pecena, Brittany Presslor, Kathleen Rutledge, Sandra L Schoenke, Sandra G Sheridan, Lois A Sturino, Laura Swift, Rita Tibbs, Cindy J Toole, Susan D Valdez, Elizabeth Ann Webber [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Kristen Anderson, Tammy Banks, Jameson Baudelaire, Amy Clay, Carla S Crow, Lisa Donatelli, Teri L Eriksen, Margaret E Foltz, Danielle Y Fugate, Jennifer Gardner, Shelly Marie Gaul, Deborah J Geiman, Darren E Hayes, Keri Holtsclaw, Cerena D Kovach, Patricia A Lane, Sarah Lavergne, Jeannine Lowe, Brenda McIntosh, Carolyn Miles, Sheila Oliver, Edes Page, Leona R Payne, Carol D Pecena, Brittany Presslor, Kathleen Rutledge, Sandra L Schoenke, Sandra G Sheridan, Lois A Sturino, Laura Swift, Rita Tibbs, Cindy J Toole, Susan D Valdez, Elizabeth Ann Webber (pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
October 15, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Bonnie K Brenneman, Yulneka Brown, Kimberly L Byers, Linda G Clanton, Dollie Davis, Janet F Davis, Susan Derooy, Jolene T Drake, Joanne Drury, Rebecca S Elliott, Colbi Ewing, Barbara A Hasson Brown, Debbie L Holth, Arlene E Howard, Camille Jackson, Suzanne Johnson, Michelle L Kinkead, Nichole M Lavely, Sara Mattison, Patricia K Palmer, Traci Perdue, Deborah A Perri, Denise A Pinckney, Dana Poteet, Patricia M Powers, Patsy Sewell, Angela L Smith, Jeanne Valanzola, Andrea J Venuto, Dianne Vogl, Michelle Witt, Rebecca Woodard, Cathy Woy, Teresa Y Wright [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Bonnie K Brenneman, Yulneka Brown, Kimberly L Byers, Linda G Clanton, Dollie Davis, Janet F Davis, Susan Derooy, Jolene T Drake, Joanne Drury, Rebecca S Elliott, Colbi Ewing, Barbara A Hasson Brown, Debbie L Holth, Arlene E Howard, Camille Jackson, Suzanne Johnson, Michelle L Kinkead, Nichole M Lavely, Sara Mattison, Patricia K Palmer, Traci Perdue, Deborah A Perri, Denise A Pinckney, Dana Poteet, Patricia M Powers, Patsy Sewell, Angela L Smith, Jeanne Valanzola, Andrea J Venuto, Dianne Vogl, Michelle Witt, Rebecca Woodard, Cathy Woy, Teresa Y Wright (pty:pla).] (With attachments) (SmoleModified on 10/16/2018 (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
October 10, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Donna Biagini, Denise C Bishop, Ashley Collins, Susan Duncan, Teresa Eschenburg, Diana Gottke, Dawn M Harrell, Audre E Hein, Terri L Hemmah, Darlene Hipps, Christine Infelise, Kristy K Keller, Kathi Kendall, Lisa Marie Mullaney, Linda M Woodson [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Donna Biagini, Denise C Bishop, Ashley Collins, Susan Duncan, Teresa Eschenburg, Diana Gottke, Dawn M Harrell, Audre E Hein, Terri L Hemmah, Darlene Hipps, Christine Infelise, Kristy K Keller, Kathi Kendall, Lisa Marie Mullaney, Linda M Woodson(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
October 8, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Amy J Brace, Karen L Buskness, Kelly N Castle, Wendy S Chase, Lucia E Espinosa, Shelley Falk, Debra G Fisher, Jennifer R Hood, Emilie Iezzi, Sharon N Kaplan, Diana Lauper, Emi Pilant, Melissa A Post, Debbie L Ryan, Diane M Signorelli, Sheila Szafranski, Gale Taylor, Jeanne L Wallace (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
October 3, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Sharon Bell, Laura B Bridges, Ronica A Brown, Marguerite English, Alice R Estrada, Nancy J Fitch, Ellen M Lemanski, Randi Morgan, Gwen C Parkman, Amy Varnum, Lenora Wozniak [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Sharon Bell, Laura B Bridges, Ronica A Brown, Marguerite English, Alice R Estrada, Nancy J Fitch, Ellen M Lemanski, Randi Morgan, Gwen C Parkman, Amy Varnum, Lenora Wozniak (pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
October 1, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Valree M Creed, Eva J Cupka, Charles Curtiss, Maria Ann Flack, Louise M Guhman, Tammy Carol Hale, Vickie Jordan, Donna M Kristofik, Laura Roberts, Linda A Ruffin, Theresa Sheppard, Lisa Slechta, Sonya M Sutherland, Barbara Thornton, Lisa R Ware [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Valree M Creed, Eva J Cupka, Charles Curtiss, Maria Ann Flack, Louise M Guhman, Tammy Carol Hale, Vickie Jordan, Donna M Kristofik, Laura Roberts, Linda A Ruffin, Theresa Sheppard, Lisa Slechta, Sonya M Sutherland, Barbara Thornton, Lisa R Ware(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
September 28, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Phyllis D Barnes, Wendy M Blankenship, Karen Broussard, Deborah A Calendine, Doreen Hughes, Jamie N Kutzer, Joseph B Linson, J Michele Pocius, Monica Ramsey, Michelle Scott, Jolottie S Sweatmon [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Phyllis D Barnes, Wendy M Blankenship, Karen Broussard, Deborah A Calendine, Doreen Hughes, Jamie N Kutzer, Joseph B Linson, J Michele Pocius, Monica Ramsey, Michelle Scott, Jolottie S Sweatmon.] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
September 27, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Judy Adcock, Carole L Burns, Jody Dovin, Roxanne Dupuis, Susan Evans, Margaret A Hagerty, Gilberta M Iorg, Cora Johnston, Kathleen D Kelley, Lynn F Lastinger, Cathy S LeFils, Levice Margie McAtee, Cathy A McCully, Lynette McDevitt, Patricia A Nading, Denise A Patton, Tania L Petry, Susan C Poindexter, Penny D Rachiell, Susan J Robertson, Gloria A Staples, Kimberly J Stevens, Christina Tice, Roseanne H Trela, Wilma J Turner, JoAnne J Warren, Adrienne J Winand, Cynthia Zoltek [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Judy Adcock, Carole L Burns, Jody Dovin, Roxanne Dupuis, Susan Evans, Margaret A Hagerty, Gilberta M Iorg, Cora Johnston, Kathleen D Kelley, Lynn F Lastinger, Cathy S LeFils, Levice Margie McAtee, Cathy A McCully, Lynette McDevitt, Patricia A Nading, Denise A Patton, Tania L Petry, Susan C Poindexter, Penny D Rachiell, Susan J Robertson, Gloria A Staples, Kimberly J Stevens, Christina Tice, Roseanne H Trela, Wilma J Turner, JoAnne J Warren, Adrienne J Winand, Cynthia Zoltek (pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
September 24, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Deborah Benjamin, Linda Boatwright, Melody Campbell, Rebecca S Ells, Cheryl Ferris, Tracy L Hicks, Laura A Hodge, Joanne Meyer, Selena V Reidworrell, Debra J Reneau, Barbara L Smith, Kathy A Thomas, Pamela Van Schaick, Patricia Zeleznik [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Deborah Benjamin, Linda Boatwright, Melody Campbell, Rebecca S Ells, Cheryl Ferris, Tracy L Hicks, Laura A Hodge, Joanne Meyer, Selena V Reidworrell, Debra J Reneau, Barbara L Smith, Kathy A Thomas, Pamela Van Schaick, Patricia Zeleznik.] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
September 21, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Rene D Bain, Kathy Chapin, Marcia Mauch [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Rene D Bain(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Kathy Chapin(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Marcia Mauch(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
September 20, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Fidela V Agado, Deborah N Autry, Jessica M Baney, Yvette Barrientes, Donna M Beltz, Laura Jeneine Bond, Nancy J Brodeur, Kerry M Brown Peters, Carol A Casner, Sally Clough, Kristine Crawford, Sarah Dafler, Marion Di Scenza, Lisa E Diede, Betty T Durrett, Trina M Dyer, Linda Ertel, Debra R Friess, Andrea Garrett, Saundra L Garrett, Theresa A Gaspar, Amy Greene, Laurie T Gremonprez, Lynette Gullett, Linda A Halladay, Kristen M Jacobsen, Vanessa L Johnson, Karen E Ledbetter, Lorraine K Long, Donna Lunsford, Tonya Mardis Ashcom, Sherry Yvonne Martin, Geraldine L Mathes, Lori A Mazonas, Pamela A McKinnon, Lisa J Parrish, Marianna Pinello, Esther Rumfelt, Susan Schmidt, Elaine Segura, Anjana Sharma, JoJenna J L Shumate, Pamela J Stiffler, Gabriel K Thomas, Paula True, Judith L Weaks [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Fidela V Agado, Deborah N Autry, Jessica M Baney, Yvette Barrientes, Donna M Beltz, Laura Jeneine Bond, Nancy J Brodeur, Kerry M Brown Peters, Carol A Casner, Sally Clough, Kristine Crawford, Sarah Dafler, Marion Di Scenza, Lisa E Diede, Betty T Durrett, Trina M Dyer, Linda Ertel, Debra R Friess, Andrea Garrett, Saundra L Garrett, Theresa A Gaspar, Amy Greene, Laurie T Gremonprez, Lynette Gullett, Linda A Halladay, Kristen M Jacobsen, Vanessa L Johnson, Karen E Ledbetter, Lorraine K Long, Donna Lunsford, Tonya Mardis Ashcom, Sherry Yvonne Martin, Geraldine L Mathes, Lori A Mazonas, Pamela A McKinnon, Lisa J Parrish, Marianna Pinello, Esther Rumfelt, Susan Schmidt, Elaine Segura, Anjana Sharma, JoJenna J L Shumate, Pamela J Stiffler, Gabriel K Thomas, Paula True, Judith L Weaks.] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
September 17, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Cindy A Biro, Sheila Blyth, Kelly Crowell, Brandy Garrett, Catherine Harrington, Linda M Kalbac, Tammy L Schultz, Jayme Stewart, Susan E Wrisley [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Cindy A Biro, Sheila Blyth, Kelly Crowell, Brandy Garrett, Catherine Harrington, Linda M Kalbac, Tammy L Schultz, Jayme Stewart, Susan E Wrisley.] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
September 14, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Vicki Adams, Melissa J Adelson, Susan R Aitken, Billie Jan Arceneaux, Jean Baez, Yvonne Marie Bair, Lora Baker, Renee Baker, Janice A Baldwin, Kristine K Bartels, Christine Baxter, Sallie Bellows, Jill Belzer, Christine M Benard, Eve M Bennett, Susan R Bohn, Allison A Boice, Wendy S Bouchillon, Gayla R Bryant, Sherrie Buress, Jo Ellen Carnes, Karen Carruthers, Elizabeth Carter, Joann L Clapacs, Darla K Collins, Valerie Cook, Pamela L Cox, Theresa M Crane, Karen S Dale, Margit Davis, Sandra DeGroot, Traci L Dean, Kim N Dent, Dina R Di Dio, Norma E Dulac, Annette Flores, Darlene M Fowler, Donna J Fowler, Tracy Getz, Kathy G Gregg, Jane Guido, Jacqueline Guynn, Jennifer Hunter, Debra Jenkins, Linda Kessler, Catherine Kleve, Marsha Kradle, Valerie A Krampetz, Gail L Lairmore, Pamela K Lovelace, Margaret E Mackey, Mary Jane Martin, Cherie L McCann, Denise Marie McDonald, Karyn A Menke, Shawnee Newman, Helen Niccum, Carol O'Connor, Carol P O'Neill, Valerie E Odom, Marguerite A Ovellette, Mary Parsley, Marie A Plum, Elaina Marie Rande, Tracy Reilly, Donna Schwanz, Sherry L Sherry, Jane M Sparkowich, Kathy Staude, Sherry L Stewart, Margaret E Storms, Deana Strauss, Rhonda Sutton, Mary E Swanson, Bonnie Theis, Margaret E Turk, Narlayne J Vaclavik, Chelsea Vaquero, Doreen Whittaker, Sue M Wike, Tamika Wilson, Brenda Wynn, Beverly K Yow [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Vicki Adams, Melissa J Adelson, Susan R Aitken, Billie Jan Arceneaux, Jean Baez, Yvonne Marie Bair, Lora Baker, Renee Baker, Janice A Baldwin, Kristine K Bartels, Christine Baxter, Sallie Bellows, Jill Belzer, Christine M Benard, Eve M Bennett, Susan R Bohn, Allison A Boice, Wendy S Bouchillon, Gayla R Bryant, Sherrie Buress, Jo Ellen Carnes, Karen Carruthers, Elizabeth Carter, Joann L Clapacs, Darla K Collins, Valerie Cook, Pamela L Cox, Theresa M Crane, Karen S Dale, Margit Davis, Sandra DeGroot, Traci L Dean, Kim N Dent, Dina R Di Dio, Norma E Dulac, Annette Flores, Darlene M Fowler, Donna J Fowler, Tracy Getz, Kathy G Gregg, Jane Guido, Jacqueline Guynn, Jennifer Hunter, Debra Jenkins, Linda Kessler, Catherine Kleve, Marsha Kradle, Valerie A Krampetz, Gail L Lairmore, Pamela K Lovelace, Margaret E Mackey, Mary Jane Martin, Cherie L McCann, Denise Marie McDonald, Karyn A Menke, Shawnee Newman, Helen Niccum, Carol O'Connor, Carol P O'Neill, Valerie E Odom, Marguerite A Ovellette, Mary Parsley, Marie A Plum, Elaina Marie Rande, Tracy Reilly, Donna Schwanz, Sherry L Sherry, Jane M Sparkowich, Kathy Staude, Sherry L Stewart, Margaret E Storms, Deana Strauss, Rhonda Sutton, Mary E Swanson, Bonnie Theis, Margaret E Turk, Narlayne J Vaclavik, Chelsea Vaquero, Doreen Whittaker, Sue M Wike, Tamika Wilson, Brenda Wynn, Beverly K Yow (pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
September 12, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Terri L Booth, Catherine Chmura, Gail Hutton, Susan Ikpoh, Julia L Irwin, Carol A Jolin, Kathleen Leach, Sandra Lee, Cheryl Martin, Vicky McClure, Melinda Nunez, Brenda J Rushe, Saundra S Scarlett, Tammy L Sikora, Sheree Strid, Dara Thompson, Tracy Watkins (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
September 11, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Deborah J Adams, Donna B Armentrout, Esther Chaney Baker, Robin D Barefoot, Johanna N Billups, Diana R Biro, Vickie Blakeman, Sharon Boody Dean, Mary Ann Braunbeck, Sharon Brooks, Jacqueline M Brown, Vicki Bunch, James Burton, Marie Cain, Martha A Carson, Jennifer Cavalet, Elizabeth J Champagne, Theresa Chodkiewicz, Rhonda Cobb, Janet Coffman, Lisa Cunningham, M Susan Cunningham, Stephanie Curran, Betty Danielson, Stephanie DePoma, Nancy A Dean, Marjorie K Delzeit, Patricia A Denehy, Patrice L Dixon, Kristina M Dougherty, Marsha Dowling, Kimberly Eliashuk, Beth A Ellis, Deborah M Foster, Kandi Frey, Deborah G Gause, Amanda L Gavorek, Janelle Gawarecki, Diane Gibas, Victoria Gordon, Laine Goulooze, Stacey L Grazier, Connie Horton, Barbara Jansky, Maureen Johnson, Terrie Johnson, Betty Kimble, Lizabeth Knight, Karen M Kush, Deborah J Land, Vanessa Leavitt, Karen M Letavish, Sharon K Mallory, Delores F Marcus, Amanda Matchett, Mildred Ann McDaniels, Dana McHargue, Carla J McIntyre, Dawn McPeak, Barbara A Michaud, Christine Molnar, Pamela Louise Morgan, Traci M Muchler, Marcia Mueller, Angela Muhammad, Saundra A Mulkey, Michelle Myers, Darlene D. Neal, Miriam L Norton, Arletta J Oriani, Anne Yvonne Padilla, Ann Palacios, Donna Mary Palmer, Cathy E Palovcsik, Shelley L Pampanin, Janet Passano, Penny L Payton, Jenny Peters, Patsy R Phipps, Candace L Pitchford, Nancy C Pruett, Kathy Quigley, Pamela Dee Ragsdale, Joyce Ratajczak, Janice Reardon, Susan Riggan, Susie Rivera, Krista Rizzo, Melissa E Rouse, Virginia Salisbury, Carolyn J Sawyer, Cheryl Saylor, Susan K Schrader, Jacqueline Schule, Laura Shockey, Samantha Siegfried, Dawn Smith, Marla Kim Smith, Shelley M Snyder, Maureen A Stallone, Sandra Stein, Cynthia Steward, Cammie Stralko, Kimberly A Styons, Delores C Taylor, Lorrie Taylor, Ruth L Tayson, Linda A Thomas, Nancy Toth, Cathy A Tournoux, Susan Travis, Cathy Vallee, Gaila Vanderpool, Beverly L Waldrup, Michelle Walters, Vera Lyne Ward, Annette M Watson, Susan Weathersby, Lois M Webb, Lisa D Weis, Theresa Wharton, Jennifer Whipp, Katherine White, Candace Wilcox, Christie Wilson, Shannon Woodhall, Gail Young, April Youngblood (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
September 7, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Karen M. Aureli, Heidi Bettis, Belinda Blackburn, Daniel T. Brenneman, Karen Burke, Susanne Carlson, Sandra L. Clark, Kelly Webb Drummond, Laurie Ertz, Patricia French, Vivian W. Freppon, Carol A. Glidden, Linda J. Grant, Bonnie Hernandez, Anne Jacobs, Amy I. Klingenberger, Sandra LaCroix, Serena M. Leight, Tracey Lumley, Mary Ann Makay-Poland, Janine S. Mitchell, Sherry L. Montgomery, Susan Noreen Mullaney, Elizabeth A. Nelson, Dolores O'Grady, Edward E. Peterson, Margaret Hoerst Pether, Jonell A. Pope, Mary C. Quade, Kimberley Richardson, Eva C. Russell, Nickida Scott, Susan Sharifie, Cathy Sipes-Rich, Nancy Skipper, Gina L. Steinbarger, Jannell Tardif, Angela Thilges, Holly Thomas, Laura Thurnes, Marta K. Turner [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Karen M. Aureli, Heidi Bettis, Belinda Blackburn, Daniel T. Brenneman, Karen Burke, Susanne Carlson, Sandra L. Clark, Kelly Webb Drummond, Laurie Ertz, Patricia French, Vivian W. Freppon, Carol A. Glidden, Linda J. Grant, Bonnie Hernandez, Anne Jacobs, Amy I. Klingenberger, Sandra LaCroix, Serena M. Leight, Tracey Lumley, Mary Ann Makay-Poland, Janine S. Mitchell, Sherry L. Montgomery, Susan Noreen Mullaney, Elizabeth A. Nelson, Dolores O'Grady, Edward E. Peterson, Margaret Hoerst Pether, Jonell A. Pope, Mary C. Quade, Kimberley Richardson, Eva C. Russell, Nickida Scott, Susan Sharifie, Cathy Sipes-Rich, Nancy Skipper, Gina L. Steinbarger, Jannell Tardif, Angela Thilges, Holly Thomas, Laura Thurnes, Marta K. Turner.] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
September 7, 2018 Filing 62 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #61 Notice of Consent(s) to Join,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ) by Lori Adam, Bonnie L Allison, Emily Andrews, Brenda M Barker, Dianna L Barnett, Susan D Brosnahan, Dana Brown, Beth C Burton, Amy L Clark, Charlene Clements, Tessa Conaway, Ruth M Conley, Nikki V Cormier, Robynne P Cornell, Laurie Cranfield, Lynn P Donnell, Lori A Drinkwater, Patricia Emery, Dena Flynn, Monica A Frye, Patricia Gomez, Judith B Hammond, Laura Hampton, Janelle M Hegrenes, Michelle L Helffrich, Gloria C Hubbard, Elvira Hurd, Karen Jorgensen, Roxane Mackey, Peggy Nell Mangieri, Michelle Manzo, Royann Marshall, Janice Matthews, Donna J Mayer, Pamela M McCord, Stacy McCurdy, Stacey McDaniel, Terri L Michl-Brummer, Errin Moore, Jean A Munier, Kimberly Naparstek, Jacqueline Nicholson, Elisa Palmer, Jaede L Quint, Gina M Romero, Judith Scanlon, Denise R Scott, Kelly Shellenberger, Allison Shelley, Theresa A Slaughter, Donna Smith, Maria J Smith, Susan Snyder, Bonnie L Spaulding, Eleanor Jean Tokarski, Christine A Troutman, Deborah Lynn Welzien, Velma Wilkerson, Ann Wittler, Lonette S Worthey (Smolen, Donald)
September 6, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Lori Adam, Bonnie L. Allison, Emily Andrews, Brenda M. Barker, Dianna L. Barnett, Susan D. Brosnahan, Dana Brown, Beth C. Burton, Amy L. Clark, Charlene Clements, Tessa Conaway, Ruth M. Conley, Nikki V. Cormier, Robynne P. Cornell, Laurie Cranfield, Lynn P. Donnell, Lori A. Drinkwater, Patricia Emery (Keel), Dena Flynn, Monica A. Frye, Patricia Gomez, Judith B. Hammond, Laura Hampton, Janelle M. Hegrenes, Michelle L. Helffrich, Gloria C. Hubbard, Elvira Hurd, Karen Jorgensen, Roxane Mackey, Peggy Nell Mangieri, Michelle Manzo, Royann Marshall, Janice Matthews, Donna J. Mayer, Pamela M. McCord, Stacy McCurdy, Stacey McDaniel, Terri L. Michl-Brummer, Errin Moore, Jean A. Munier, Kimberly Naparstek, Jacqueline Nicholson, Elisa Palmer, Jaede L Quint, Gina M. Romero, Judith Scanlon, Denise R. Scott, Kelly Shellenberger, Allison Shelley, Theresa A. Slaughter, Donna Smith, Maria J. Smith, Susan Snyder, Bonnie L. Spaulding, Eleanor Jean Tokarski, Christine A. Troutman, Deborah Lynn Welzien, Velma Wilkerson, Ann Wittler, Lonette S. Worthey [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Lori Adam(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Bonnie L. Allison(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Emily Andrews(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Brenda M. Barker(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Dianna L. Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Susan D. Brosnahan(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Dana Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Beth C. Burton(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Amy L. Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Charlene Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Tessa Conaway(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Ruth M. Conley(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Nikki V. Cormier(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Robynne P. Cornell(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Laurie Cranfield(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Lynn P. Donnell(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Lori A. Drinkwater(pty:plaAttorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Patricia Emery (Keel)(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Dena Flynn(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Monica A. Frye(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Patricia Gomez(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Judith B. Hammond(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Laura Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Janelle M. Hegrenes(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Michelle L. Helffrich(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Gloria C. Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Elvira Hurd(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Karen Jorgensen(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Roxane Mackey(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Peggy Nell Mangieri(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Michelle Manzo(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Royann Marshall(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Janice Matthews(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Donna J. Mayer(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Pamela M. McCord(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Stacy McCurdy(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Stacey McDaniel(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Terri L. Michl-Brummer(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Errin Moore(pty:plaAttorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Jean A. Munier(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Kimberly Naparstek(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Kimberly Naparstek(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Jacqueline Nicholson(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Elisa Palmer(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Jaede L Quint(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Gina M. Romero(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Judith Scanlon(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Denise R. Scott(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Kelly Shellenberger(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Allison Shelley(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Theresa A. Slaughter(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Donna Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Maria J. Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Susan Snyder(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Bonnie L. Spaulding(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Eleanor Jean Tokarski(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Christine A. Troutman(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Deborah Lynn Welzien(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Velma Wilkerson(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Ann Wittler(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Lonette S. Worthey(pty:pla), (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
September 5, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Karen M. Aldeman, Cheryl Atwood, Cheryl Beauchamp, Kim Bradley, Laurie Carr, Rhonda D. Christian, Jody L. Daedlow, Tonya DeKruger, Edelwisa Elomina, Heather Gatheridge, Ryan Harding, Brenda L. Hoogasian, Meagan E. Jaegers, Anissa Jeffers, Tara Jirak, Louise A. Jobe, Cheryl L. Klein, Sidne L. Kneeland, Michelle Knight, Kristie L. LeValley, Deborah Leas, Christa J. Lima, David McKearney, Jonathan G. Mitchell, Debora T. Newman, Margaret E. Nieman, Linda Nitzschke, Linda J. Palmisino, Marie Peacock, Janette E. Petersen, Julie Lynn Pindell, Barbara Jean Rasmussen, Brentz Catherine Robinson, Julie Rogers, Tonya Rohrbaugh, Jane M. Sebek, Karen F. Sedeski, Cynthia Staake, Mechele Stykes, Melanie M. Tepp, Pauline A. Turner, Melissa D. White, Linda Wright [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to parties Karen M. Aldeman, Cheryl Atwood, Cheryl Beauchamp, Kim Bradley, Laurie Carr, Rhonda D. Christian, Jody L. Daedlow, Tonya DeKruger, Edelwisa Elomina, Heather Gatheridge, Ryan Harding, Brenda L. Hoogasian, Meagan E. Jaegers, Anissa Jeffers, Tara Jirak, Louise A. Jobe, Cheryl L. Klein, Sidne L. Kneeland, Michelle Knight, Kristie L. LeValley, Deborah Leas, Christa J. Lima, David McKearney, Jonathan G. Mitchell, Debora T. Newman, Margaret E. Nieman, Linda Nitzschke, Linda J. Palmisino, Marie Peacock, Janette E. Petersen, Julie Lynn Pindell, Barbara Jean Rasmussen, Brentz Catherine Robinson, Julie Rogers, Tonya Rohrbaugh, Jane M. Sebek, Karen F. Sedeski, Cynthia Staake, Mechele Stykes, Melanie M. Tepp, Pauline A. Turner, Melissa D. White, Linda Wright.] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
September 4, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Marcy R. Brown-Thomas, Sarah J. Carter, Violet D. Branson, Cynthia Walker, Shirley Nicholson, Kathy L. Graves, Diana Cox, Kishan Desai, Migdalia Silvestros, Janie R. Conroy, Dana Haugen, Jill D. Gould, Nancy Weidenhamer, Lori Adam, Melissa Adelson, Laura M. Allen, Meryl Anderson, Sandra A. Arnold, Karla Ashline, Lisa Ayala, George Backalukas, Lora B. Baker, Connie L. Baldwin, Kristine Bartlett, Sharyn Bastiani, Celeste Bates, Sherryll Beach, Jeanne C. Bell, Charles E. Benson, Sr, Barbara Bissonnette, Brenda W. Blake, Deborah S. Boudreau, Barbara D. Boyd, Carla F. Boyd, Nancy J. Boyer, Dorita Brooks, Jacqueline M. Brown, Barbara J. Brownson, Amy Bruce, Ruth M. Carnahan, Judith Casey, Shannon L. Castle, Connie Christensen, Juliana Cifaldi, Charlene Clements, Heather Clemmons, Julian F. Clift, Paula Clinton, Steven A. Colten, Tessa Conaway, Gail M. Corliss, Suzan Cousino, Margaret E. Craig, Laurie M. Cranfield, Shannon L. Crist, Carla S. Crow, Minerva Cuellar, Laurie Cugino, Maureen E. Daly-Schaefer, Judith D'Angelo, Kathi L. Dean, Mary Dean, Michelle M. Dean, Ann Marie Deitch, Sherry L. Deloatch, Kathy Delory, Penny K. Dennis, Patrice L. Dixon, Sheryl Doggett, Lynn P. Donnell, Cassandra J. Dunbar, Dorothy A. Elliott, Beth A. Ellis, Mary K. Ellis, Patricia L. Emery, Kay Fahlbusch, Kimberly Fairchild, Cynthia Faust, Lisa A. Flanagan, Karen D. Fletcher, Erica Flinn, Holly Flores, Pamela A. Folz, Danna K. Frazier, Lisa M. Funston, Jolinda Furguiele, Sherri L. Gault, Venita Gauna, Stacy Jo Gerner, Susan E. Gevaart, Roger Glasko, Catherine D. Glenn, Kelley Gray, Leslie Griffis, Jacqueline Guynn, Linda Hagen, Carla M. Halkias, Dorene Hammons, Kelly R. Hannah, Pamela M. Hannan, Danielle M. Hardesty, Susan Hare, Samantha Heinemann, Gina C. Henderson, Marilee Hill, Kara Hillard, Renee Hinkle, Beth Hluszti, Christie Holby, Beth R. Hopper, Denise Hostetler, John H. Howard, Jennifer J. Hunter, Jeanine R. Hurley, Norma James, Kristina Johnson, Sheila M. Johnson, Tracy Jones, Karen Jorgensen, Kerri A. Kadrmas, Sharon V. Kays, Kathleen F. Keane, Lisa Kidwell, Lori D. Kirkwood, Amy I. Klingenberger, Margaret Larose, Yvonne Lawrence, Aileen Lengyel, Karen M. Lenke, Linda Lloyd, Louise A. Long, Renee T. Long, Jill M. Lopez, Debra L. Lugo, Glenna S. Lundquist, Candace Mack, Tracy Magnuson, Linda Ann Maiullo, Maryann Makaypoland, Nicole S. Mann, Jennifer Marble, Cynthia S. McGinley, Carol McGruder, Mary Ann Meier, Lea Mendoza, Stephanie Merrington, Jessica D. Miller, Cynthia W. Mills, Teresa L. Mills, Ann Mitchell, Kashonda T. Mitchell, Virginia M. Mize, Linda L. Moment, Carrie Moore, Cyndl Moore, Misty D. Moore, Mary R. Morningstar, Cynthia Mowers, Elizabeth A. Nelson, Donna F. Nichols, Kristin E. Niel, Carol O'Connor, Cathy E. Palovcsik, Lisa S. Parker, Nancy Phillips, Jo Ann Piner, Kathy Pipich, Susan Pittman, Pamela A. Posthauer, Julie M. Powers, Tina D. Pratt, Jaede L. Quint, Janice Reardon, Michelle W. Register, Susie Rivera, Nedra Robinson, Rachel B. Rosenberger, Gena Rusnak, Debbie Sandall, Kristina Scalone, Elizabeth Scharnhorst, Emily Schepel, Linda Schermerhorn, Jacqueline J. Schule, Linda Seevers, Jeannine T. Sheehan, Audrey R. Sheffield, Kelly A. Shields, Lisa Simmons, Sharon Simpson, Nancy K. Skipper, Kindra E. Slater, Jana H. Slatton, Marla Sloan, Dianna M. Snyder, Patricia C. Solari, Mary E. Sorbara, Marilyn Spargrove, Susan Spaulding, Melanie N. Spendlove, Sherry L. Stewart, Jennifer Strohl, Sandra J. Sweeny, Judith K. Taggart, Christi A. Tapella, Hope Taylor, Susan Teggatz, Sue Terry, Holly C. Thomas, Dawn Y. Tieffenbacher, Susan K. Tippen, Marianne Tolley, Susan G. Travis, Christine Troutman, Carmen Tucker, Patricia Unversaw, Janet Varey, Carla Vincent, April Wall, Melinda H. Walsh, Michelle Walters, Marla Weiss, Doreen Whittaker, Candace Wilcox, Angela D. Williams, Pamela K. Wood, Terryl Wood, Beverly R. Woods, Lonette S. Worthey [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Marcy R. Brown-Thomas(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Sarah J. Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Violet D. Branson(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Cynthia Walker(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Shirley Nicholson(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Kathy L. Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Diana Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Kishan Desai(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Migdalia Silvestros(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Janie R. Conroy(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Dana Haugen(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Jill D. Gould(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Nancy Weidenhamer(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Lori Adam(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Melissa Adelson(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Laura M. Allen(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Meryl Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Sandra A. Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Karla Ashline(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Lisa Ayala(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party George Backalukas(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Lora B. Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Connie L. Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Kristine Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Sharyn Bastiani(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Celeste Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Sherryll Beach(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Jeanne C. Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Charles E. Benson, Sr(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Barbara Bissonnette(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Brenda W. Blake(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Deborah S. Boudreau(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Barbara D. Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Carla F. Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Nancy J. Boyer(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Dorita Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Jacqueline M. Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Barbara J. Brownson(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Amy Bruce(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Ruth M. Carnahan(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Judith Casey(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Shannon L. Castle(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Connie Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Juliana Cifaldi(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Charlene Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Heather Clemmons(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Julian F. Clift(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Paula Clinton(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Steven A. Colten(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Tessa Conaway(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Gail M. Corliss(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Suzan Cousino(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Margaret E. Craig(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Laurie M. Cranfield(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Shannon L. Crist(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Carla S. Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Minerva Cuellar(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Laurie Cugino(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Maureen E. Daly-Schaefer(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Judith D'Angelo(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Kathi L. Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Mary Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Michelle M. Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Ann Marie Deitch(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Sherry L. Deloatch(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Kathy Delory(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Penny K. Dennis(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Patrice L. Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Sheryl Doggett(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Lynn P. Donnell(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Cassandra J. Dunbar(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Dorothy A. Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Beth A. Ellis(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Mary K. Ellis(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Patricia L. Emery(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Kay Fahlbusch(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Kimberly Fairchild(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Cynthia Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Lisa A. Flanagan(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Karen D. Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Erica Flinn(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Holly Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Pamela A. Folz(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Danna K. Frazier(pty:pla)
August 7, 2018 Filing 58 ANSWER (Re: #29 Amended Complaint ) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Russell, John)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Joint Motion to Approve FLSA Conditional Certification Notice ; granting #56 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 56 Joint MOTION to Approve FLSA Conditional Certification Notice and Brief in Support (Re: #54 Opinion and Order, Ruling on Motion for Collective Action Certification ) by Kandi Frey, Jennifer Goode, Lorraine Long, Elaina Rande (With attachments) (Warta, David)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULING ORDER), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): Class Certification ( Discovery due by 5/23/2019, Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2019 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline set 8/6/2018) ; granting in part and denying in part #44 Motion for Collective Action Certification (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Defendants granted until August 7, 2018, to answer Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ; granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
July 13, 2018 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint (Re: #29 Amended Complaint ) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Russell, John)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting motion to dismiss, in part, the second amended complaint ; granting #42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 29, 2018 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #44 MOTION for Collective Action Certification Conditional ) by Kandi Frey, Jennifer Goode, Lorraine Long, Elaina Rande ; (Smolen, Donald)
March 16, 2018 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Court-Authorized Notice (Re: #44 MOTION for Collective Action Certification Conditional ) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. ; (With attachments) (Russell, John)
March 2, 2018 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. ; (Russell, John)
February 16, 2018 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Kandi Frey, Jennifer Goode, Lorraine Long, Elaina Rande ; (Warta, David)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Defendants are granted until March 15, 2018 to file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification ; granting #45 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
February 16, 2018 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification (Re: #44 MOTION for Collective Action Certification Conditional ) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Russell, John)
February 1, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for Collective Action Certification Conditional by Kandi Frey, Jennifer Goode, Lorraine Long, Elaina Rande (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case, as Defendants have filed a Motion to Dismiss [Doc. #42 which should first be resolved. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 26, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Russell, John)
January 23, 2018 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Unredacted) of Scheduling Conference held on 1/12/2018 before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (Pages: 1-18). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: A party must file a Transcript Redaction Request within 21 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, this unredacted transcript may be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may view the transcript at the court public terminal at no charge or may purchase a copy from the court reporter. (Re: #40 Minutes of Scheduling Conference, Adding/Terminating Party(ies), Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s)) (bpn, CrtRptr) Modified on 4/23/2018 to remove transcript access restriction (sac, Dpty Clk).
January 12, 2018 Filing 40 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell: Scheduling Conference held on 1/12/2018 , terminating party Transcend Services and Transolutions, Inc., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/26/2018) (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 11, 2018 Filing 39 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel E Smolen on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Daniel E Smolen added to party Lorraine Long(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel E Smolen added to party Elaina Rande(pty:pla).] (Smolen, Daniel)
January 11, 2018 Filing 38 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Arthur Warta on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Warta, David)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (TIME CHANGE ONLY) Scheduling Conference moved from 10:00 am to 10:30 am on January 12, 2018, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Scheduling Conference set for 1/12/2018 at 10:30 AM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (Re: 34 Minute Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s), ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell allowing Gary Friedman to appear telephonically at Scheduling Conference on 1/12/2018. Contact courtroom deputy (918-699-4708) with your contact information prior to the date set for hearing ; granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 29, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Russell, John)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell resetting 1/3/2018 Scheduling Conference ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Scheduling Conference set for 1/12/2018 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #33 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2017 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to Reset Scheduling Conference (Re: 32 Minute Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), ) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Russell, John)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell setting Scheduling Conference for January 3, 2018. If any party requests a court reporter be present for the conference, please notify the Courtroom Deputy by 1/2/2018, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2018 at 02:30 PM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Plaintiffs have filed a Second Amended Complaint in response to the defendants' motion for partial dismissal of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. The motion for partial dismissal is therefore moot ; finding as moot #26 Motion to Dismiss (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKFJ, Judge)
December 22, 2017 Filing 30 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Russell, John)
December 21, 2017 Filing 29 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Lorraine Long, Kandi Frey, Jennifer Goode, Elaina Rande (Smolen, Donald)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting extension of time to file joint status report ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Report due by 12/22/2017); granting #27 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 15, 2017 Filing 27 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) for Three-Day Extension of Time to Submit Joint Status Report (Re: #25 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report ) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Russell, John)
December 1, 2017 Filing 26 Partial MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint and Brief in Support by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Russell, John)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/19/2017) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 24, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join FLSA Action by Elaina Rande, Lorraine Long [Note: Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Elaina Rande(pty:pla), Attorney Donald Eugene Smolen, II added to party Lorraine Long(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Smolen, Donald)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Re Attorneys Gary D. Friedman, Celine Chan and Larsa Kateh Ramsini) ; granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 17, 2017 Filing 22 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #14 Appearance - Attorney, ) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Thrutchley, Christopher)
October 17, 2017 Filing 21 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #13 Appearance - Attorney ) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Russell, John)
October 17, 2017 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Nuance Communications, Inc. for Nuance Transcription Services, Inc.) by Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Russell, John)
October 17, 2017 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nuance Communications, Inc. (Russell, John)
October 17, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Larsa Kateh Ramsini to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1836060) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (With attachments) (Russell, John)
October 17, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Celine Chan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1836050) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (With attachments) (Russell, John)
October 17, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gary D. Friedman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1836044) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (With attachments) (Russell, John)
October 17, 2017 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Justin Andrew Lollman on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. [Note: Attorney Justin Andrew Lollman added to party Nuance Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Andrew Lollman added to party Nuance Transcription Services, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Lollman, Justin)
October 17, 2017 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher S Thrutchley on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. [Note: Attorney Christopher S Thrutchley added to party Nuance Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher S Thrutchley added to party Nuance Transcription Services, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Thrutchley, Christopher)
October 17, 2017 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John David Russell on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. (Russell, John)
October 13, 2017 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Nuance Communications, Inc. and Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell extending deadline to Answer or otherwise respond to Amended Complaint (Deadline: 12/2/2017) ; granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 11, 2017 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer , or Otherwise Respond (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc. [Note: Attorney John David Russell added to party Nuance Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John David Russell added to party Nuance Transcription Services, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Russell, John)
September 14, 2017 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc., Transcend Services, Transolutions, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Kandi Frey, Jennifer Goode (Warta, David)
September 12, 2017 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case following the appointment of Magistrate Judge Jayne, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne, Magistrate Judge X no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 17-cv-472-GKF-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
September 5, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join FLSA Collective Action by Jennifer Goode, Kandi Frey [Note: Attorney David Arthur Warta added to party Kandi Frey(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Warta, David)
August 30, 2017 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Maryann Margaret Hon on behalf of Jennifer Goode [Note: Attorney Maryann Margaret Hon added to party Jennifer Goode(pty:pla).] (Hon, Maryann)
August 30, 2017 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura L Hamilton on behalf of Jennifer Goode [Note: Attorney Laura L Hamilton added to party Jennifer Goode(pty:pla).] (Hamilton, Laura)
August 30, 2017 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald Eugene Smolen, II on behalf of Jennifer Goode (Smolen, Donald)
August 29, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 25, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Nuance Communications, Inc., Nuance Transcription Services, Inc., Transcend Services, Transolutions, Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1815496) by Jennifer Goode (With attachments) (Warta, David)
August 25, 2017 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jennifer Goode (Warta, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goode et al v. Nuance Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuance Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Celine Chan
Represented By: Justin Andrew Lollman
Represented By: John David Russell
Represented By: Christopher S Thrutchley
Represented By: Larsa K Ramsini
Represented By: Gary D Friedman
Represented By: Barry J Miller
Represented By: Katherine E Perrelli
Represented By: Hillary J Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuance Transcription Services, Inc.
Represented By: Celine Chan
Represented By: Justin Andrew Lollman
Represented By: John David Russell
Represented By: Christopher S Thrutchley
Represented By: Larsa K Ramsini
Represented By: Gary D Friedman
Represented By: Barry J Miller
Represented By: Katherine E Perrelli
Represented By: Hillary J Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcend Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transolutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Goode
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Represented By: Laura L Hamilton
Represented By: Maryann Margaret Hon
Represented By: Dennis Albert Caruso
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Christensen
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora T Newman
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidne L Kneeland
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Bartlett
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terryl Wood
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayme Stewart
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret E Nieman
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy L Hicks
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnee Newman
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie M Tepp
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Jean Rasmussen
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Flinn
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Toth
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen F Keane
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Clough
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Thomas
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Molnar
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie A Plum
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle Gawarecki
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth R Hopper
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra DeGroot
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn P Donnell
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Scanlon
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan E Gevaart
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Flores
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Gatheridge
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royann Marshall
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle M Hegrenes
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sallie Bellows
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Nicholson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise R Scott
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Walker
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorene Hammons
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Holby
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saundra L Garrett
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie L McCann
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saundra A Mulkey
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie E Odom
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine M Benard
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Blyth
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy A Biro
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Chodkiewicz
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Rohrbaugh
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret E Craig
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Garrett
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie K Delzeit
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Theis
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Lynn Pindell
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila M Johnson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Makay-Poland
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J Stiffler
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Carlson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laine Goulooze
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise A Jobe
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody L Daedlow
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Meier
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah J Land
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Riggan
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Lumley
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki V Cormier
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dara Thompson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie M Powers
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Delory
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie L LeValley
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L Helffrich
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Lawrence
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry L Sherry
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Whipp
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Sutton
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karyn A Menke
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya DeKruger
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Horton
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aileen Lengyel
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherryll Beach
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon L Crist
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Makaypoland
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina L Steinbarger
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serena M Leight
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela K Lovelace
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna M Snyder
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Ikpoh
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin E Niel
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Rumfelt
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Pipich
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy J Brodeur
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Nitzschke
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meagan E Jaegers
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela M Hannan
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathi L Dean
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane M Sebek
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hunter
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Thurnes
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla J McIntyre
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Benjamin
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Hampton
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Hillard
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Wilcox
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Ratajczak
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie A Krampetz
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Cuellar
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venita Gauna
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Moore
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam L Norton
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela D Williams
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Baker
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannell Tardif
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha A Carson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dena Flynn
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla M Halkias
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth A Ellis
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Crowell
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly R Hannah
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Shellenberger
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Brown
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy E Palovcsik
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy L Schultz
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Jenkins
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Weiss
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Susan Cunningham
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Scharnhorst
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria J Smith
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly A Shields
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen E Daly Schafer
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth C Burton
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley L Pampanin
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Shelley
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Schwanz
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ertel
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen M Jacobsen
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arletta J Oriani
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Schepel
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Niccum
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Woodhall
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon L Castle
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy J Boyer
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Hoerst Pether
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Mauch
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Lee
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Naparstek
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky McClure
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline A Turner
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Spargrove
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Johnson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Magnuson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Segura
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gena Rusnak
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Skipper
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane M Sparkowich
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty D Moore
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine K Long
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxane Mackey
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle M Dean
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel T Brenneman
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Gullett
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Jeneine Bond
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Atwood
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jana H Slatton
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velma Wilkerson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Kidwell
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan K Tippen
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Simpson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Webb Drummond
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa L Johnson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda H Walsh
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Louise Morgan
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Yvonne Padilla
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia L Emery
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Barrientes
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Hostetler
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura M Allen
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Ertz
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidela V Agado
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meryl Anderson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lynn Welzien
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nedra Robinson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizabeth Knight
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Guido
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna L Barnett
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ellen Carnes
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Travis
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina M Dyer
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi A Tapella
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith B Hammond
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret E Storms
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Spaulding
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margit Davis
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina D Pratt
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Van Schaick
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn McPeak
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Wynn
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Ann McDaniels
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy G Gregg
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline M Brown
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Mack
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Kimble
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Knight
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail L Lairmore
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy L Clark
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy McCurdy
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Jones
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora B Baker
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen M Lenke
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Haugen
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickida Scott
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Phillips
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Burke
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Hernandez
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley M Snyder
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Young
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Bruce
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Greene
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Dean
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Marble
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Vincent
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Coffman
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen D Fletcher
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Kim Smith
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Getz
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anjana Sharma
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaila Vanderpool
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy I Klingenberger
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia C Solari
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Clinton
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline J Schule
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela A Folz
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori A Drinkwater
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechele Stykes
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole S Mann
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Peters
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol P O'Neill
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda D Christian
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora Baker
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Ferris
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori D Kirkwood
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy A Tournoux
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Parsley
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet D Branson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie L Spaulding
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Crawford
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberley Richardson
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcy R Brown Thomas
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Carr
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri L Booth
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Kleve
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianna Pinello
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migdalia Silvestros
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Rizzo
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois M Webb
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Thilges
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Wittler
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Cox
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie R Conroy
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanine R Hurley
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela M McC