SEAY v. 3M et al
Plaintiff: ELLEN T. SEAY and ROBERT SEAY
Defendant: 3M, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, CRANE COMPANY, BURNS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION, IMO INDUSTRIES, JOHN CRANE, GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, OAKFABCO, INC., MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC., BECHTEL CORPORATION, VIACOM, INC., EXXON MOBIL CORP., ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC., D.B. RILEY, INC., AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE USA, INC., BECHTEL INC. doing business as BECHTEL INC. OF NEVADA also known as C & I GIRDLER COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BECHTEL, INC., ETC., ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP., GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, UNIROYAL, INC., PFIZER, INC., PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC., COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., JOHN CRANE PACKING COMPANY, CRANE COMPANY/LEAR ROME DIVISION, A.K. STEEL CORPORATION, UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC., OGLEBAY NORTON COMPANY, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, FOSECO, INC., BALTIMORE ENNIS, CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC., NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATION, BIRD INCORPORATED, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, CATERPILLAR, INC., CLEAVER BROOKS CO., SEPCO CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, KEWANEE BOILER MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., CBS CORP., BECHTEL POWER CORP., FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., HOBART CORPORATION, MAREMOUNT CORP., MT. VERNON MILLS, INC., AMETEK, INC., ASTEN, INC., DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., RHONE-POULENC AG COMPANY, INC., DANA CORPORATION, ASARCO, INC., SOCONY MOBIL OIL COMPANY, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND BY MERGER TO MAGNOLIA PETROLEUM COMPANY, BECHTEL GROUP, INC., SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC., KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC., CSR, INC. doing business as ENCORE CORPORATION, AQUA-CHEM, INC. doing business as CLEVER-BROOKS DIVISION, ASTEN-HILL, MORTON THIOKOL, GARLOCK, INC., CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC., IMO DELAVAL, TRANSAMERICA DELAVAL, AND DELAVAL TURBINE, NORTH BROTHERS, INC., SQUARE D, ERIE CITY IRON WORKS, CLEAVER BROOKS, INC., THOMPSON HAYWARD CHEMICAL COMPANY, SCAPA FABRICS, INC., WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC., POWERS REGULATOR COMPANY, DEMING CO., CHAPMAN VALVE MFG. CO., ALLOYCO VALVE, GREFCO, INC., INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY, TURNER SUPPLY COMPANY, BORGWARNER INDUSTRIAL PRODUCT, SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACK PUMP CO., M-I L.L.C., HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO., KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT, INC., OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., PEERLESS HEATER COMPANY, ASTEN GROUP, BORG-WARNER CORPORATION AND BW, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, U.C. REALTY CORPORATION, ITT GOULDS PUMP, H.B. ZACHERY COMPANY, UNIROYAL FIBER & TEXTILE DIVISION OF UNIROYAL, INC., CIRCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC., UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTIC COMPANY, INC., CROMPTON PLASTICS, FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION, COASTAL RUBBER GASKET COMPANY, ANCO INSULATIONS, INC., ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, SCAPA GROUP, INC., CROSSFIELD PRODUCTS CORPORATION, WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC COMPANY, MORTON THIOKOL doing business as MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC., A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, UNION CARBIDE CHEMICAL AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC., CSR AMERICA, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CARBORUNDUM, UNIVERSAL OIL PRODUCTS COMPANY, ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION, CRANE COMPANY/HYDRO-AIRE DIVISION, C & I GIRDLER COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BECHTEL, INC., ETC., FLUOR CORPORATION, MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING CO., CRANE COMPANY/CRANE VALVE GROUP, CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC. and ARMCO STEEL CORP.
Case Number: 2:2008cv86366
Filed: August 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL VIABLE DEFENDANTS IN THE CASES LISTED IN "EXHIBIT A," ATTACHED, ARE DISMISSED AND THE CASES ARE TRANSFERRED TO TO THE "BANKRUPTCY ONLY" DOCKET. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CASES BE MARKED CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/25/2011. 4/27/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jcab)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS BY THE PLAINTIFFS IN THE ABOVE-ENTITLED ACTION ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. ONLY, EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/14/2011. 4/16/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT AND JOINDERS IN MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, IN THE CASES LISTED IN "EXHIBIT A" ATTACHED, ARE GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT JUDGEMENT SHALL BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF ONLY DEFENDANTS LISTED IN THE CASES IN EXHIBIT A, ATTACHED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/12/11. 4/13/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED (dp, )
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT A ATTACHED, ARE GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF ONLY THE DEFENDANTS LISTED IN THE CASES IN EXHIBIT A ATTACHED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/30/2011. 4/1/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jcab)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER THAT HEARINGS IN ALL PENDING OPPOSED DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, WILL BE HELD 4/26/11 AT 10:00AM. SEE ATTACHED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/23/11. 3/25/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER THAT ALL PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT BIRD INCORPORATED BE AND ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/18/11. 3/23/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO STRIKE, LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED ARE GRANTED AS NO OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/7/11. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Part 2) 3/8/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ahf)
February 24, 2011 Filing 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Itemization of Undisputed Facts, Memorandum Brief, or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss filed by FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION.Memorandum Brief.(VAUGHN, THOMAS)
January 6, 2011 Filing 64 NOTICE by OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. re #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment of JOINDER IN CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (STUDEBAKER, JENNIFER)
December 30, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION re #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF JOINDER IN CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' COMBINED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ITEMIZATION OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND MEMORANDUM BRIEF (VAUGHN, THOMAS)
December 29, 2010 Filing 62 NOTICE by OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. re #58 MOTION to Strike of JOINDER IN CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' NOTICE REGARDING EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES AND REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM DISCLOSING EXPERTS/FILING EXPERT REPORTS AND MOTION TO STRIKE ANY LATE FILED EXPERT REPORTS BY PLAINTIFF (STUDEBAKER, JENNIFER)
December 28, 2010 Filing 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., AMETEK, INC., CROSSFIELD PRODUCTS CORPORATION, FOSECO, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY, NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., TURNER SUPPLY COMPANY, ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(JONES, CHRISTI)
December 27, 2010 Filing 60 NOTICE by CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. of Designation of Fact and Expert Witnesses (WATTS, MICHAEL)
December 27, 2010 Filing 59 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION re #58 MOTION to Strike of JOINDER IN CERTAIN DEFENDANTS NOTICE REGARDING EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES AND REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM DISCLOSING EXPERTS/FILING EXPERT REPORTS AND MOTION TO STRIKE ANY LATE FILED EXPERT REPORTS BY PLAINTIFF (VAUGHN, THOMAS)
December 21, 2010 Filing 58 MOTION to Strike filed by AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., AMETEK, INC., CROSSFIELD PRODUCTS CORPORATION, FOSECO, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY, NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., TURNER SUPPLY COMPANY, ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(COLE, T.)
December 17, 2010 Filing 57 Witness List by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Certificate of Service (MANGUM, KIMBERLY)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS AGAINST AMETEK, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO HAVEG INDUSTRIES, INC., SHOULD BE DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, IN THE ABOVE-STYLED AND NUMBERED CAUSES, WITH PLAINTIFFS SPECIFICALLY RESERVING THEIR RIGHTS AGAINST ALL OTHER DEFENDANTS. EACH PARTY SHALL BEAR ITS OWN COSTS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/14/10. 12/16/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
December 16, 2010 Filing 55 NOTICE by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY of Expert Reports (MANGUM, KIMBERLY)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER THAT THE COMPLAINT, ALL AMENDEMENTS THERETO, INCLUDING ALL CLAIMS OR CAUSES OF ACTION WHICH WERE, OR MIGHT HAVE BEEN, ASSERTED BY THE PLAINTIFFS AGAINST ANCO INSULATIONS, INC. SHALL BE AND SAME ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/15/10. 11/17/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ahf)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FROM THIS ACTION WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/3/10. 11/5/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 22, 2010 Filing 52 NOTICE by ROBERT SEAY of Substitution of Counsel (RASPANTI, VITO)
October 12, 2010 Filing 51 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC..(WATT, WILLIAM)
September 28, 2010 Filing 50 NOTICE by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. of Service of Discovery (WATT, WILLIAM)
September 23, 2010 Filing 49 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC..(WATT, WILLIAM)
September 23, 2010 Filing 48 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC..(WATT, WILLIAM)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFF ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT H.B. ZACHRY COMPANY ONLY, WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/1/2010. 9/20/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 19, 2010 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY P. HUBBARD on behalf of GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY with Certificate of Service(HUBBARD, JEFFREY)
August 18, 2010 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY P. HUBBARD on behalf of MAREMOUNT CORP. with Certificate of Service(HUBBARD, JEFFREY)
August 16, 2010 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY L. STRAIN on behalf of SQUARE D with Certificate of Service(STRAIN, STACEY)
August 16, 2010 Filing 43 NOTICE by SEPCO CORPORATION Notice of Service of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admissions Propounded to Plaintiff with Certificate of Service (DUKES, WALTER)
August 13, 2010 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY L. STRAIN on behalf of MAREMOUNT CORP. with Certificate of Service(STRAIN, STACEY)
August 12, 2010 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY L. STRAIN on behalf of GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY with Certificate of Service(STRAIN, STACEY)
August 3, 2010 Filing 40 MOTION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MAREMONT CORPORATION IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE INTITIAL DISCLOSURES UNTIL 7/26/2010. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/29/2010. 8/3/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (kk, )
July 30, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE by A.K. STEEL CORPORATION, ARMCO STEEL CORP. Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (LANOUX, LOUIS)
July 29, 2010 Filing 38 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, by A.K. STEEL CORPORATION, ARMCO STEEL CORP..(LANOUX, LOUIS)
July 26, 2010 Filing 37 NOTICE by SQUARE D of Service of Initial Disclosures (HUBBARD, JEFFREY)
July 26, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by LOUIS B. LANOUX on behalf of A.K. STEEL CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(LANOUX, LOUIS)
July 23, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE by AMETEK, INC. Pre-Discovery Initial Disclosures (MASSENBURG, CHRISTOPHER)
July 19, 2010 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSE MARIE WADE on behalf of BECHTEL CORPORATION, BECHTEL GROUP, INC., BECHTEL INC., BECHTEL POWER CORP., SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC. with Certificate of Service(WADE, ROSE)
July 16, 2010 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSE MARIE WADE on behalf of VIACOM, INC. with Certificate of Service(WADE, ROSE)
July 15, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE by BIRD INCORPORATED of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure (POWERS, MATTHEW)
July 15, 2010 Filing 31 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information (VAUGHN, THOMAS)
July 15, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE by ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC. of Service of Initial Disclosures (JONES, CHRISTI)
July 15, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE by CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. Initial Disclosures (WATTS, MICHAEL)
July 14, 2010 Filing 28 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by ROBERT SEAY.(COLEMAN, ALICE)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE CAPTIONED PLAINTIFFS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AGAINST IMO INDUSTRIES INC. WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/25/2010. 7/14/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING DEADLINES SHALL BE SET FORTH AS OUTLINED HEREIN, IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/30/10. 7/6/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ah)
June 8, 2010 Filing 25 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, by WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Dismissal)(DANOS, JOSHUA)
May 28, 2010 Filing 24 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, Separate Answer and Defenses to Third Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service by SEPCO CORPORATION.(DUKES, WALTER)
May 21, 2010 Filing 23 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, by CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC..(WATTS, MICHAEL)
May 20, 2010 Filing 22 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MANGUM, KIMBERLY)
May 20, 2010 Filing 21 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H.B. ZACHERY COMPANY.(MANGUM, KIMBERLY)
May 17, 2010 Filing 20 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, by FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION.(VAUGHN, THOMAS)
May 10, 2010 Filing 19 Third Amended Complaint against A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, et al. filed by ROBERT SEAY, Indidivually, as Representative of the ESTATE OF EVERETT ARTHUR SEAY, Deceased, and on behalf of the Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of EVERETT ARTHUR SEAY, Deceased, Certificate of Service. ($350 filing fee paid)(mbh, )
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO COMPLY WITH THE ORDER REQUIRING SEVERED AND AMENDED COMPLAINTS, IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/14/10. 4/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ah)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL VIABLE DEFENDANTS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO FILE SEVERED AND AMENDED COMPLAINTS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/1/2010. 4/19/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmf, )
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WILL BE HELD ON MAY 11TH, 2010 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S FAILURE TO APPEAR OR TO BE EXCUSED FROM APPEARING WILL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THAT PLAINTIFF'S CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/6/10. 4/8/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ah)
February 26, 2010 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 filed by KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC., ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP., U.C. REALTY CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WHITEHEAD, MICHAEL)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT, WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS, EACH INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ONE SEVERED AND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS COURT. THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IS DIRECTED TO ASSIGN CIVIL ACTION NUMBERS TO EACH INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFF. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS SECTION OF THE INSTANT ORDER MAY RESULT, UPON MOTION BY ANY CONCERNED DEFENDANT OR BY RULE TO SHOW CAUSE ISSUED BY THE COURT, IN THE DISMISSAL OF THAT SPECIFIC PLAINTIFFS CIVIL ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(B), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jaa, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT ALL CAUSES OF ACTIONS AGAINST MOBILE CORPORATION, PARENT OF MOBIL OIL CORPORATION,INCORRECTLY SUED AS EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, SHALL BE AND SAME ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS, ETC.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/28/09. 11/9/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED (kk, )
October 26, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by W. CHARLES MCVEA on behalf of WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC., CRANE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MCVEA, W.)
September 2, 2009 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by ELLEN T. SEAY.Certificate of Service.(COLEMAN, ALICE)
July 28, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by BYRON N. BROWN, IV on behalf of HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO. (BROWN, BYRON)
July 6, 2009 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by ELLEN T. SEAY. (COLEMAN, ALICE)
July 6, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL N. WATTS on behalf of CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(WATTS, MICHAEL)
June 18, 2009 Filing 7 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by BIRD INCORPORATED.Certificate of Service.(CROFT, MARCY)
April 17, 2009 Filing 6 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT "A" AS AGAINST DEFENDANTS ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP. and MT. VERNON MILLS, INC. AND SCAPA WAYCROSS, INC. BE AND SAME ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/17/09. 4/24/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(eibo, )
November 21, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHERI D. GREEN on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES (GREEN, CHERI)
October 28, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER W. DUKES on behalf of SEPCO CORPORATION, MT. VERNON MILLS, INC. (DUKES, WALTER)
August 7, 2008 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (nds)
August 7, 2008 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (nds)
August 7, 2008 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 222 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF MISSISSIPPI, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (nds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEAY v. 3M et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY
Represented By: W. CHARLES MCVEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES
Represented By: CHERI D. GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAKFABCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL CORPORATION
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXON MOBIL CORP.
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.B. RILEY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL INC. doing business as BECHTEL INC. OF NEVADA also known as C & I GIRDLER COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BECHTEL, INC., ETC.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS E. VAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE PACKING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY/LEAR ROME DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.K. STEEL CORPORATION
Represented By: LOUIS B. LANOUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OGLEBAY NORTON COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: STACEY L. STRAIN
Represented By: JEFFREY P. HUBBARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSECO, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALTIMORE ENNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIRD INCORPORATED
Represented By: MARCY B. CROFT
Represented By: MATTHEW F. POWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS E. VAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEPCO CORPORATION
Represented By: WALTER W. DUKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEWANEE BOILER MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORP.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL POWER CORP.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM LEE WATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOBART CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMOUNT CORP.
Represented By: STACEY L. STRAIN
Represented By: JEFFREY P. HUBBARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT. VERNON MILLS, INC.
Represented By: WALTER W. DUKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMETEK, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER O. MASSENBURG
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTEN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL N. WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHONE-POULENC AG COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASARCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCONY MOBIL OIL COMPANY, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND BY MERGER TO MAGNOLIA PETROLEUM COMPANY
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL GROUP, INC.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR, INC. doing business as ENCORE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQUA-CHEM, INC. doing business as CLEVER-BROOKS DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTEN-HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON THIOKOL
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK, INC.
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO DELAVAL, TRANSAMERICA DELAVAL, AND DELAVAL TURBINE
Represented By: CHERI D. GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH BROTHERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE D
Represented By: STACEY L. STRAIN
Represented By: JEFFREY P. HUBBARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE CITY IRON WORKS
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMPSON HAYWARD CHEMICAL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCAPA FABRICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA WESLEY DANOS
Represented By: W. CHARLES MCVEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POWERS REGULATOR COMPANY, DEMING CO., CHAPMAN VALVE MFG. CO., ALLOYCO VALVE
Represented By: W. CHARLES MCVEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREFCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNER SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORGWARNER INDUSTRIAL PRODUCT, SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACK PUMP CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-I L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO.
Represented By: BYRON N. BROWN, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER MARIE STUDEBAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS HEATER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTEN GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER CORPORATION AND BW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KIMBERLY P. MANGUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.C. REALTY CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT GOULDS PUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. ZACHERY COMPANY
Represented By: KIMBERLY P. MANGUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL FIBER & TEXTILE DIVISION OF UNIROYAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIRCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTIC COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROMPTON PLASTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS E. VAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.
Represented By: MARY WINTER VAN SLYKE
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COASTAL RUBBER GASKET COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCO INSULATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCAPA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROSSFIELD PRODUCTS CORPORATION
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON THIOKOL doing business as MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. SMITH CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RILEY STOKER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CHEMICAL AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARBORUNDUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL OIL PRODUCTS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY/HYDRO-AIRE DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & I GIRDLER COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BECHTEL, INC., ETC.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY/CRANE VALVE GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: DEBRA L. SWANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMCO STEEL CORP.
Represented By: LOUIS B. LANOUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLEN T. SEAY
Represented By: ALICE WINDHAM COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SEAY
Represented By: ALICE WINDHAM COLEMAN
Represented By: VITO J. RASPANTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?