STATE OF WISCONSIN et al v. INDIVIOR INC. et al
Plaintiff: STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF KANSAS, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF LOUSIANA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF VERMONT, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF GEORGIA and STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Defendant: INDIVIOR INC., RECKITTBENCHISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD., INDIVIOR PLC and MONOSOL RX, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv05073
Filed: September 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MONOSOL RX LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (16-CV-5073, DOC. NO. 142) IS DENIED. DEFENDANT MONOSOL SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/30/2017. 10/30/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 406 IN 13-MD-2445) (ems)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT INDIVIOR PLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 139 ) IS GRANTED AND ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT INDIVIOR PLC ARE DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/25/2017. 10/25/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL (SEE DOC. NO. 402 IN 13-MD-2445). (aeg)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANT RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 141) IS GRANTED AND ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD. ARE DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/16/2017. 10/17/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 399 IN 13-MD-2445) (ems)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT DEFENDANT INDIVIOR INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 305 IN 13-MD-2445; DOC. NO. 138 IN 16-CV-5073) IS DENIED. DEFENDANT INDIVIOR SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/8/2017. 9/8/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 396 IN 13-MD-2445) (ems)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF WISCONSIN et al v. INDIVIOR INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WISCONSIN
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: BILLINGTON M. GARRETT
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ALASKA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: CLYDE E. SNIFFEN, JR.
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: JOHN E. ALEXANDER
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: CHERYL LEE JOHNSON
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Represented By: QUYEN D. TOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: JENNIFER H. HUNT
Represented By: DEVIN MICHAEL LAIHO
Represented By: ABIGAIL L. SMITH
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: CATHERINE A. JACKSON
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: GARY M. BECKER
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Represented By: MICHAEL A. UNDORF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: RODNEY I. KIMURA
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Represented By: ANGELINA M. WHITFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: LAYNE M. LINDEBAK
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By: LYNETTE R. BAKKER
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY
Represented By: LEEANNE APPLEGATE
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: CHARLES W. ROWLAND
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF LOUSIANA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: STACIE LAMBERT DEBLIEUX
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: LINDA J CONTI
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: CHRISTINA M. MOYLAN
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: ELLEN S. COOPER
Represented By: GARY HONICK
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: CAROL E. HEAD
Represented By: MATTHEW M. LYONS
Represented By: WILLIAM T. MATLACK
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DARRIN FRANK FOWLER
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: JUSTIN R. ERICKSON
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: CRYSTAL UTLEY SECOY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MISSOURI
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: AMY C. HAYWOOD
Represented By: MICHAEL SCHWALBERT
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEBRASKA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: COLLIN M. KESSNER
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: AMY E. MCFARLANE
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Represented By: SAAMI ZAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: KIMBERLEY A. D'ARRUDA
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF OHIO
Represented By: THOMAS N. ANGER
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: BETH A. FINNERTY
Represented By: BRIAN F. JORDAN
Represented By: MATTHEW K. MCKINLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By: JULIE A. BAYS
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: RACHEL A. IRWIN
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: JOSEPH STEPHEN BETSKO
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: CLARK C. KIRKLAND, JR.
Represented By: CHANTELLE LYTLE NEESE
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF TENNESSEE
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: CYNTHIA E. KINSER
Represented By: J. DAVID MCDOWELL
Represented By: ERIN F. MERRICK
Represented By: JENNIFER E. PEACOCK
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF UTAH
Represented By: BRIAN M. CHRISTENSEN
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Represented By: EDWARD T VASQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: SARAH OXENHAM ALLEN
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: TYLER T. HENRY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: STEPHEN THAYER FAIRCHILD
Represented By: CHIEDZA NZIRAMASANGA
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF IDAHO
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: BRETT T. DELANGE
Represented By: JOHN K OLSON
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: SUZANNE M KETTERIDGE
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Represented By: NICHOLAS M. SYDOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: KATHERINE A. CAMPBELL
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: BYRON D. HADLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Represented By: MONICA ANNE SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: DOUGLAS L. DAVIS
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIVIOR INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN BERMAN
Represented By: MARK R. LENTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECKITTBENCHISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD.
Represented By: BENJAMIN ERNST
Represented By: MARK A. FORD
Represented By: ANDREW S. GALLINARO
Represented By: NANCY J. GELLMAN
Represented By: HOLLY OVINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIVIOR PLC
Represented By: JONATHAN BERMAN
Represented By: MARK R. LENTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONOSOL RX, LLC
Represented By: CASSANDRA A ADAMS
Represented By: KENNETH EWING
Represented By: JAMES F. HIBEY
Represented By: DAMON J. KALT
Represented By: ANDREW J. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?