PREACHER v. CORRECT CARE SERVICES
Plaintiff: JOHN DALE PREACHER
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SERVICES, DR. KROSS, COUNSELOR MICHAEL STELLA, C.O. DOWD, DEPUTY WADSWORTH, LIEUTENANT TROUT, C.O. RYAN T. PROKOP, C.O. MCCONNELL, C.O. KUZMA, HEARING EXAMINER WIGGINS, C.O. PHILLIPS, ALLEN JOSEPH, SGT. GAGNON, DR. SANTOS, KEVIN TURNER, ERIC TICE, DAN CARO, ANTHONY GUMBAREVIC, ROBERT GILMORE, C.O. W.J. SANDERS, JOHN WETZEL, C.O. PALAUZZO, DR. KAUFNAN, BRIAN HYDE, MAJOR BUZAS, MELISSA R. HAINSWORTH, CAPTAIN BROTHERS, WALLACE LEGGETT, MICHAEL ZAKEN, C.O. WIDMER, JOEY SPICHER and LIEUTENANT ABBOTT
Case Number: 2:2019cv01207
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Referring Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 Addional EXHIBITS in Support of #9 Motion for TRO,, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by JOHN DALE PREACHER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4a, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Envelope) (jv)
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 Additional OBJECTIONS to #11 Report and Recommendation filed by JOHN DALE PREACHER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Envelope) (ma)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTIONS to #11 Report and Recommendation by JOHN DALE PREACHER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Envelope) (ma)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on November 6, 2019. (jbh)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit, request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this order to defendant as directed by plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/5/2019. (dm)
November 5, 2019 Service copies taken to US Marshal in Pittsburgh 11/6/2019 (dm)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. It is respectfully recommended that Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and/or a preliminary injunction be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 10/25/2019, Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 10/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/11/2019. (dm)
October 11, 2019 Judge Cathy Bissoon added as presiding and Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo added as referred. Motions referred to Richard A. Lanzillo. (cjo)
October 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo no longer presiding on case. (cjo)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Plaintiff is directed to provide USM285 forms for each defendant named in his case so they may be properly served. USM285 forms due by October 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/8/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for a TRO and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause and TRO, #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and TRO) (jm) Modified text on 10/4/2019. (dm). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 10/4/2019 (dm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JOHN DALE PREACHER. (jm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: #1 Declaration) (jm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JOHN DALE PREACHER. (jm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by JOHN DALE PREACHER. (jm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against C.O. DOWD, C.O. KUZMA, C.O. MCCONNELL, C.O. PALAUZZO, C.O. PHILLIPS, C.O. W.J. SANDERS, C.O. WIDMER, CAPTAIN BROTHERS, DAN CARO, CORRECT CARE SERVICES, DEPUTY WADSWORTH, DR. KAUFNAN, DR. KROSS, ROBERT GILMORE, ANTHONY GUMBAREVIC, MELISSA R. HAINSWORTH, HEARING EXAMINER WIGGINS, BRIAN HYDE, ALLEN JOSEPH, WALLACE LEGGETT, LIEUTENANT ABBOTT, MAJOR BUZAS, SGT. GAGNON, JOEY SPICHER, ERIC TICE, KEVIN TURNER, JOHN WETZEL, MICHAEL ZAKEN, filed by JOHN DALE PREACHER. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2, #2 List of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Certificate of Service) (jm)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 9/26/2019. (dm)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JOHN DALE PREACHER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjg)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JOHN DALE PREACHER. (jd)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOHN DALE PREACHER. (Attachments: #1 Authorization, #2 Inmate Account Statement, #3 Complaint Lodged pending ruling on Motion for IFP) #4 supplement) #5 Complaint part 2) (jd) #6 Motion For Appt of Counsel, #7 Declaration In Support of Motion to Appt Counsel, #8 List of Exhibits, #9 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraing Order and Preliminary Injunction, #10 Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order, #11 Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order, #12 Exhibits) #13 Envelope) (jd) Modified text on 9/24/2019. (jd) (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/24/2019) (jd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #14 Affidavit OF TRUTH) (jd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #15 Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a TRO and Priliminary Injunction) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PREACHER v. CORRECT CARE SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DALE PREACHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. KROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNSELOR MICHAEL STELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. DOWD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY WADSWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT TROUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. RYAN T. PROKOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. MCCONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. KUZMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEARING EXAMINER WIGGINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN JOSEPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. GAGNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. SANTOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC TICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN CARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY GUMBAREVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT GILMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. W.J. SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. PALAUZZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. KAUFNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN HYDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR BUZAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA R. HAINSWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN BROTHERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALLACE LEGGETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL ZAKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. WIDMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEY SPICHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT ABBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?