National Labor Relations Board v. Oakland Grove Health Care Center

Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Respondent: Oakland Grove Health Care Center
Intervenor: United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 328
Case Number: 1:2019cv00069
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: Lincoln D Almond
1 Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 HEARING CANCELLED re: #5 Order to Show Cause: Show Cause Hearing previously scheduled for Monday 3/11/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge William E. Smith is hereby CANCELLED (Jackson, Ryan)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/11/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Labor Relations Board. Responses due by 3/22/2019. (Vorro, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Oakland Grove Health Care Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Handbook Policies, #2 Exhibit Attendance Bonus Memo, #3 Exhibit Facility Staff Meetings, #4 Exhibit Job Postings, #5 Exhibit Job Description, #6 Exhibit Employee List, #7 Exhibit Complaints, #8 Exhibit Thibeault Statement, #9 Exhibit Suspension Notice, #10 Exhibit Woodruff Notes, #11 Exhibit Zamperini Notes, #12 Exhibit Initial Charge, #13 Exhibit Position Statement, #14 Exhibit Request for Evidence, #15 Exhibit Response to RFE, #16 Exhibit Amended Charge, #17 Exhibit ULP Complaint, #18 Exhibit Answer to ULP Complaint)(DiOrio, Anthony)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 Respondent's ANSWER to Complaint Petition by Oakland Grove Health Care Center.(DiOrio, Anthony)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response re #11 Response to Motion, filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Charles Moncrief Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Anthony St. John Affidavit, #3 Affidavit Adan Sales Garcia Affidavit)(Vorro, Elizabeth)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response re #8 Response to Motion, filed by United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 328. (Gursky, Marc)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE In Opposition to #2 MOTION To try case on affidavits in lieu of full evidentiary hearing filed by Oakland Grove Health Care Center. Replies due by 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Portion of NLRB Manual)(DiOrio, Anthony)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. DiOrio on behalf of Oakland Grove Health Care Center (DiOrio, Anthony)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION to Intervene filed by National Labor Relations Board. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Vorro, Elizabeth) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/22/2019) (Simoncelli, Michael).
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET NOTE: Letter and all previously filed documents mailed via certified mail (Receipt #7015 1730 0000 1888 6421) to Oakland Grove Health Care Center on 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Documents) (Potter, Carrie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Intervene filed by United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 328. Responses due by 3/5/2019. (Gursky, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered. Show Cause Hearing scheduled for Monday 3/11/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge William E. Smith. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/19/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Labor Relations Board (Vorro, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by National Labor Relations Board in support of #1 Complaint, . (Vorro, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION To try case on affidavits in lieu of full evidentiary hearing filed by National Labor Relations Board. Responses due by 2/28/2019. (Vorro, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ULP charge filed against employer in Case 01-CA-230178, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of service of charge, #3 Exhibit Amended charge against employer, #4 Exhibit affidavit of service of amended charge and complaint, #5 Exhibit Complaint and Notice of Hearing, #6 Exhibit Answer to Complaint, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Vorro, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Labor Relations Board (Vorro, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by National Labor Relations Board in support of #1 Complaint, . (Vorro, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION To try case on affidavits in lieu of full evidentiary hearing filed by National Labor Relations Board. Responses due by 2/28/2019. (Vorro, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ULP charge filed against employer in Case 01-CA-230178, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of service of charge, #3 Exhibit Amended charge against employer, #4 Exhibit affidavit of service of amended charge and complaint, #5 Exhibit Complaint and Notice of Hearing, #6 Exhibit Answer to Complaint, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Vorro, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Labor Relations Board v. Oakland Grove Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Vorro
Represented By: Thomas E. Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Oakland Grove Health Care Center
Represented By: Anthony J. DiOrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 328
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?