Tavares v. Kettle et al
Plaintiff: Victor A. Tavares
Defendant: Captain Haibon, Jeffery Aceto, Michael Moore, Disciplinary Hearing Officers and Mathew Kettle
Case Number: 1:2019cv00266
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Victor Tavares (Jackson, Kerrie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations filed by Victor A. Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Victor A. Tavares, #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Victor A. Tavares Objections to R&R due by 6/7/2019. I recommend dismissal of the complaint for failure to state a claim; because I find Plaintiff would not be able to reframe his complaint based on due process, I recommend summary dismissal of the complaint for failure to state a claim. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). If this recommendation is adopted, this case will serve as Plaintiffs second strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g).3 If the complaint survives screening, I will grant the IFP motion and calculate the initial filing fee that must be paid before the case may proceed So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 5/24/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
May 20, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Victor A. Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Summary, #2 Envelope)(Jackson, Kerrie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Victor A. Tavares. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint. (Jackson, Kerrie)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the plaintiff to pay the civil case filing fee in the amount of $400.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 5/28/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/7/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
May 7, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Victor A. Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the plaintiff to pay the civil case filing fee in the amount of $400.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 5/28/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/7/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
May 7, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Victor A. Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tavares v. Kettle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Haibon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Aceto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disciplinary Hearing Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Kettle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor A. Tavares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?