Ponte v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: John C. Ponte
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Chairman Martin J. Gruenberg, Travis Hill, Michael J. Hsu, Rohit Chopra and Jennifer Whang
Case Number: 1:2023cv00165
Filed: April 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: Mary S McElroy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2023 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by John C. Ponte. Responses due by 7/5/2023. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Set/Reset Deadlines: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim -- Responses due by 7/14/2023.. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 6/8/2023. (Potter, Carrie)
June 1, 2023 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by John C. Ponte. Responses due by 6/15/2023. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
May 19, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 6/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Charges)(Bond, Erik)
May 9, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John C. Ponte. Michael J. Hsu served on 5/8/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
May 9, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John C. Ponte. Rohit Chopra served on 5/8/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
May 9, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John C. Ponte. Travis Hill served on 5/8/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
May 9, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John C. Ponte. Martin J. Gruenberg served on 5/8/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
May 9, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John C. Ponte. Jennifer Whang served on 5/8/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
May 8, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Reissued as to Rohit Chopra, Martin J. Gruenberg, Travis Hill, Michael J. Hsu, Jennifer Whang. (Kenny, Meghan)
May 8, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Request filed by John C. Ponte. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
May 8, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Request filed by John C. Ponte. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
May 8, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Request filed by John C. Ponte. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
May 8, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by John C. Ponte. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
May 8, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by John C. Ponte. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
April 26, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Kenny, Meghan)
April 26, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Kenny, Meghan)
April 26, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by John C. Ponte. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
April 26, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for William Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1864645 ) filed by John C. Ponte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice)(Mulhearn, Christopher)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Newman. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 4/26/2023. (Kenny, Meghan)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Newman. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 4/26/2023. (DaCruz, Kayla)
April 25, 2023 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla)
April 25, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (DaCruz, Kayla)
April 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1863964 ), filed by John C. Ponte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mulhearn, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponte v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Ponte
Represented By: Christopher M. Mulhearn
Represented By: William Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Erik B. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chairman Martin J. Gruenberg
Represented By: Erik B. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Hill
Represented By: Erik B. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Hsu
Represented By: Erik B. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohit Chopra
Represented By: Erik B. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Whang
Represented By: Erik B. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?