Conway v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Byron L Conway
Defendant: Larry Norris, Ronald Dobbs, Kay Howell, Randy Watson, Gary Burton, Jamie Johnson, Belt, R Holloway, Crosby, P Edwards, Jay Moore, J Henderson, Larry Ragland, Kevin Thomas, Westbrook, Greg Harmon, Steve Outlaw, T Ball, Green, Walton, J Lau and W Gay
Case Number: 4:2009cv00409
Filed: June 4, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2011 152 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that on the claims of plaintiff Byron L. Conway, judgment is rendered for plaintiff and against defendant RaiMundo D. Holloway. Plaintiff is awarded $50,000 in compensatory damages and $55,000 in punitive damages. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/15/11. (hph)
October 18, 2011 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge Joe J Volpe's proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; granting 129 Defendants' motion for summary judgment; and dismissing from the complaint without prejudice Defendants Norris, Dobbs, Howell, Watson, Burton, Johnson, Crosby, Moore, Henderson, and Thomas. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/18/11. (hph)
November 3, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 114 Motion for Summary Judgment of Dr. Peter Edwards and dismissing Dr. Edwards as a party deft in this case; and granting 117 Motion to Deem Admitted. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/3/10. (bkp)
October 5, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 112 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying the 108 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by P Edwards. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/5/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 94 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying document nos. 71, 72, 73 76; granting plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss deft George Belt; and denying plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/22/10. (bkp)
September 29, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion for Default Judgment without prejudice; construing 40 Motion for Copies as a request for production of documents and removing from the pending motions list; directing defts to file a response to plaintiff's motion for protective order, which the Court construes as a motion for preliminary injunction, within fifteen days of the date of this Order; and denying 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 9/29/09. (bkp)
August 11, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defts Westbrook, Outlaw, Green, Harmon, Ball, Walton, Lau and Gay for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/11/09. (bkp)
July 13, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/13/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conway v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron L Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?