Maxwell/G-Doffee et al v. Golden et al

Plaintiff: Don Merceleany R Maxwell/G-Doffee and Princess M Smith/G-Doffee
Defendant: D Golden, Allen, P Gordon, Williams, Wilson, Butler, Diggs, Sherry Conrad, Cox, Jones, Hurt, Perkins, C Davis, K Tate, Phillips, S Brown, Ray Hobbs, Dexter Payne, Many Chase, Pat O'Brian and Does
Case Number: 5:2009cv00379
Filed: December 11, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2014 286 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 285 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/18/2014. (ks)
January 16, 2014 278 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendant to file a supplemental brief in support of 269 Motion for Summary Judgment within 15 days of the date of this Order and denying 274 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 01/16/2014. (rhm)
September 6, 2013 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 257 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 253 Motion for Hearing and for Relief, which the Court construes as a motion for preliminary injunctive relief, is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/6/13. (vjt)
March 15, 2013 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 238 Motion for Hearing; denying 238 Motion for Trial; denying 242 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/15/13. (kpr)
February 10, 2012 215 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 214 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/10/12. (vjt)
December 22, 2011 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 195 Partial Report and Recommendations, and granting defendants' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/22/2011. (dmn)
July 29, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for deft Wilson, and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and Original and Amended Complaints on deft at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/29/11. (kpr)
July 7, 2011 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 148 Motion to Compel and directing defts to file proper responses to pltf's discovery requests, and file a copy of such with this Court, within ten days of the date of this Order; directing the defts to provide the last-known a ddress of deft Roy Diggs, within ten days of the date of this Order; and directing plaintiff to file a response to defts' motion for summary judgment within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/7/11. (kpr)
May 18, 2011 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 139 Motion for Reconsideration re the Court's Orders 123 136 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/18/11. (vjt)
March 29, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 101 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 72 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, which the Court construes as a Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/29/11. (vjt)
November 3, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 77 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, 58 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pat O'Brian is GRANTED, and pltf's allegations against deft are DISMISSED; Pat O'Brien terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/3/10. (vjt)
October 21, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 77 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Replies due by 11/10/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/21/10. (bkp)
September 27, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 61 MOTION to Dismiss Case: The Court construes this motion as a motion for summary judgment and directs defts to file a supplemental brief, together with exhibits and affidavits, within 10 days of the date of this Order, pltf to file a response within 10 days thereafter; and directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct naumes of the ADC defts, as set forth in the motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/27/10. (bkp)
April 16, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for the defendants and the United States Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on defendants in care of the Arkansas Board of Correction and Community Punishment Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/16/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell/G-Doffee et al v. Golden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Merceleany R Maxwell/G-Doffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princess M Smith/G-Doffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Many Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat O'Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?