Lee v. North County Fair L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Lee
Defendant: Charming Charlie, LLC, Red Robin International, Inc., Athleisure, Inc., Kevin Jewelers, Inc., New Rue21, LLC, Brighton Collectibles Holdings, Inc., Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Helzberg's Diamond Shops, Inc., H & M Hennes & Mauritz L.P., Old Navy, LLC, Lucky Brand Dungarees Stores USA, LLC, Apple, Inc., Aveda Experience Centers, Inc., D.S.A. Sports, Inc., Fabulous Nails & Spa, LLC, Pacific Sunwear of California, LLC, Francesca's Collections, Inc., Dorabati Soheila Naghdi, Sears, Roebuck and Co., Foot Locker Retail, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, The Walking Company Holdings, Inc., Vans, Inc., Royal Maui Jewelers, Inc., Oro Gold Cosmetics, Inc., Rudera 3 Corporation, Inc., Express Fashion Apparel, LLC, Jayney Corp., C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc., Sherwood Management Co., Inc., Anntaylor Retail, Inc., Hat World, Inc., Pandora Jewelry, LLC, TPP Acquisition, Inc., Alpha 3 Lima, Inc., Gamestop, Inc., Michael Kors Retail, Inc., Sterling Jewelers, Inc., Zale Delaware, Inc., Sephora USA, Inc., AT&T Corp, K Shoes Co, Forever 21, Inc., Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc., Origins Natural Resources, Inc., Kalya Enterprises, Inc., Zumiez, Inc., Ichi Trading Corporation, Genesco, Inc., Ten Perfect Nails, Inc., Doe 2, Torrid, LLC, Swarovski Retail Ventures LTD, Customized Teez SD, See's Candy Shops, Incorporated, Hakeem Milbes, Audeo Charter School, Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, The Computerized Cobbler, Luxottica Retail North America, Inc., Ben Bridge-Jeweler, Inc., Palaz Coffee Group, Inc., T.B. & J.B., INC., Salon House, LLC, Bath & Body Works, LLC, Hot Topic, Inc., Bath & Body Works Direct, Inc., M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc., Spencer Gifts LLC, American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., Target Corporation, Destination Maternity Corporation, Hollister Co. California, LLC, Fifth Avenue Jewelers & Co., LLC, 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc., Soma Intimates, LLC, Miniso Depot Escondido, LLC, Currency Exchange International, Corp., Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC, Doe 3, Charlotte Russe, Inc., Things Remembered, Inc., Lush Cosmetics, LLC, White House Black Market, Inc., J.C. Penney Properties, Inc., SS&S Investments, LLC, The Children's Place, Inc., Lorna Jane USA, Inc., The Gap, Inc., Does 4 through 10, Doe 1, Trinity Retail Unlimited, LLC, Cotton On USA, Inc., Windsor Fashions, LLC, Bandex, LLC, Q Apparel, Inc., Shiekh Shoes, LLC, Nordstrom, Inc., North County Fair L.P., Payless Shoesource, Inc., Aldo U.S. Inc., Escondido Pets, LLC, EM Jewelry & Design, LLC, The Yankee Candle Company, Inc., Tween Brands, Inc., The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Jewelry Repair Enterprises, Inc., Shoe Palace Corporation, Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc., Lahay Investments, LLC, Tapestry, Inc., Brooks Tone Stores, Inc., Claire's Boutiques, Inc., Westfield America GP, LLC, Brookstone Stores, Inc., White House Black Market, Origins Natural Resources, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Origins, Gamestop, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as GameStop, Brookstone Stores, Inc. a New Hampshire corporation doing business as Brookstone, Hat World, Inc. a Minnesota corporation doing business as Lids, Doe 3 an unknown business entity doing business as Vine Vera, Brighton Collectibles Holdings, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Brighton Collectibles, Lush Cosmetics, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Handmade Cosmetics, Sterling Jewelers, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Kay Jewelers, Nordstrom, Inc. a Washington corporation doing business as Nordstrom, T-Mobile USA, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as T-Mobile, Ben Bridge-Jeweler, Inc. a Washington corporation doing business as Ben Bridge Jewelers, Zumiez, Inc. a Washington corporation doing business as Zumiez, Apple, Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Apple Store, Miniso Depot Escondido, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Miniso, Escondido Pets, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Escondido Pets, Lorna Jane USA, Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Lorna Jane, Pandora Jewelry, LLC a Maryland limited liability company doing business as Pandora, M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as M.A.C. Cosmetics, Fabulous Nails & Spa, LLC a California corporation doing business as Fabulous Nails, 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. a California corporation doing business as 24 Hour Fitness, Michael Kors Retail, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Michael Kors, Francesca's Collections, Inc. a Texas corporation doing business as Francesca's, Things Remembered, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Things Remembered, Customized Teez SD a California Corporation doing business as Customized Teez, Bath & Body Works Direct, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Bath & Body Works, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. a New York corporation doing business as Macy's, Pacific Sunwear of California, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as PacSun, Audeo Charter School a California corporation doing business as Audeo Charter School II, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Verizon Wireless, Destination Maternity Corporation a Delaware corporation doing business as Motherhood Maternity, Doe 2 an unknown business entity doing business as GNC, Ten Perfect Nails, Inc. a California corporation doing business as 10 Perfect Nails, Jayney Corp. a California corporation doing business as Buzzes N' Beehives, EM Jewelry & Design, LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as as EM Jewelry + Design, Tapestry, Inc. a Maryland Corporation doing business as Coach Leather Ware California doing business as Coach, Old Navy, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Old Navy, Rudera 3 Corporation, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Fragranza, Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Victoria's Secret, Sephora USA, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Sephora, T.B. & J.B., INC. a California corporation doing business as Hallmark Cards & Gifts, Q Apparel, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Q Fashion, Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as bareMinerals, Lahay Investments, LLC a Nevada limited liability company doing business as Lionesse, Charlotte Russe, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Charlotte Russe, Fifth Avenue Jewelers & Co., LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Fifth Avenue Jewelers & Co., Luxottica Retail North America, Inc. an Ohio corporation doing business as LensCrafters, Sherwood Management Co., Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Daniel's Jewelers, The Gap, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Gap, Zale Delaware, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Piercing Pagoda, Cotton On USA, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Cotton On, Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc. an Ohio Corporation doing business as Abercrombie & Fitch, Hot Topic, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Hot Topic, The Yankee Candle Company, Inc. a Massachusetts corporation doing business as Yankee Candle Co., The Children's Place, Inc. which will do business in California as TCP - The Children's Place, Inc., a Delaware corporation doing business as The Children's Place, Genesco, Inc. a Tennessee corporation doing business as Journeys, Athleisure, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Sun Diego Boardshops, Hollister Co. California, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Hollister Co., Soma Intimates, LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Soma, Spencer Gifts LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Spencer's, TPP Acquisition, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Picture People, See's Candy Shops, Incorporated a California corporation doing business as See's Candies, Currency Exchange International, Corp. a Florida corporation doing business as Currency Exchange International, Palaz Coffee Group, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Elixir - Espresso & Wine Bar, Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Gymboree, Torrid, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Torrid, Royal Maui Jewelers, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Royal Maui Jewelers, New Rue21, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Rue21, Kevin Jewelers, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Kevin Jewelers, Doe 1 an unknown business entity doing business as Allegiance, The Computerized Cobbler a California corporation doing business as Computerized Cobbler, The Walking Company Holdings, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as The Walking Company, Bath & Body Works, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as White Barn Candle Company, Trinity Retail Unlimited, LLC a Nevada limited liability company doing business as Sweet Factory, Oro Gold Cosmetics, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Oro Gold, Foot Locker Retail, Inc. a New York corporation doing business as Kids Foot Locker, J.C. Penney Properties, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as JC Penney, K Shoes Co a California corporation doing business as K Shoes, Anntaylor Retail, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Loft, Kalya Enterprises, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Kalya's Silver & Body Jewelry, Express Fashion Apparel, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as Express, Dorabati Soheila Naghdi an individual doing business as Hair Studio, SS&S Investments, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as A to Z Wireless, Ichi Trading Corporation a California corporation doing business as Tokyo Japanese Lifestyle, The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. a California corporation doing business as The Cheesecake Factory, Alpha 3 Lima, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Street Comer, Claire's Boutiques, Inc. a Colorado corporation doing business as Claire's doing business as Icing, American Eagle Outfitters, Inc. an Ohio Corporation doing business as American Eagle Outfitters, Vans, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Vans, Aldo U.S. Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Aldo, Helzberg's Diamond Shops, Inc. a Missouri corporation doing business as Helzberg Diamonds, C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc. a Pennsylvania Corporation doing business as Clarks, Bandex, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Just in Time, Starbucks Corporation a Washington corporation doing business as Starbucks, Zale Delaware, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Zales Jewelers, Tween Brands, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Justice, Swarovski Retail Ventures LTD a Rhode Island corporation doing business as Swarovski, Payless Shoesource, Inc. a Missouri corporation doing business as Payless Shoesource, Hakeem Milbes an individual doing business as Men's District, Jewelry Repair Enterprises, Inc. a Pennsylvania Corporation doing business as Fast Fix Jewelry & Watch Repair, Aveda Experience Centers, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Aveda, Charming Charlie, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Charming Charlie, Shiekh Shoes, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Shiekh Shoes, Shoe Palace Corporation a California corporation doing business as Shoe Palace, D.S.A. Sports, Inc. a California limited liability company doing business as Sports Fever, Foot Locker Retail, Inc. a New York Corporation doing business as Foot Locker, H & M Hennes & Mauritz L.P. a New York limited partnership doing business as H&M, Salon House, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Brows n More, Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Pink, Windsor Fashions, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Windsor, Lucky Brand Dungarees Stores USA, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Lucky Brand Jeans, Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC an Ohio limited liability company doing business as Sunglass Hut, Target Corporation a Minnesota corporation doing business as Target, Sears, Roebuck and Co. a New York corporation doing business as Sears, AT&T Corp a New York Corporation doing business as AT&T and Red Robin International, Inc. which will do business in California as Red Robin Burger and Spirits Emporiums, a Nevada corporation doing business as Red Robin Gourmet Burgers
Case Number: 3:2018cv01920
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
2 Judge: Ruben B Brooks
3 Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
4 Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing 114 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The OSC directed Plaintiff to respond within seven days from the entry of the order, and advised that failure to make service or show good cause for the failure to serve would result in the dismissal of the action. To date, Plaintiff has filed neither a response to the OSC nor proof of service. Accordingly, the action is dismissed without prejudice. (dlg)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/10/19.(dlg)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/17/2019.(jpp)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting #107 Motion to Dismiss North County Fair L.P. The hearing set for the matter on February 22, 2019 is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/4/19. (dlg)
January 4, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel by Matthew I Kaplan on behalf of Francesca's Collections, Inc. (Kaplan, Matthew) qc email, incorrect form & attorneys are not removed from the docket without a court order (dlg).
January 4, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE of Non-Receipt of Opposition by North County Fair L.P. re #107 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) (Knight, Stacey) (dlg).
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #107 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) : A hearing date has been scheduled for February 22, 2019. Accordingly, the Court sets the following briefing schedule. Any opposition is to be filed on or before December 28, 2018. Any reply is to be filed on or before January 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/14/18.(dlg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) by North County Fair L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Knight, Stacey) (dlg).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER. The action that remains may be prosecuted only against North County Fair and Westfield with respect to Counts 1 and 2, and with respect to Customized Tees SD, North County Fair, and Westfield with respect to Counts 3 and 4. Plaintiff's claims as to the other retail defendants are dismissed without prejudice to the Plaintiff filing separate actions against them individually. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/27/18.(dlg)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting #95 Motion to Dismiss AT&T Corp (a New York Corporation). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/27/18. (dlg)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Granting Joint #99 Motion to Dismiss T.B. & J.B., Inc. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/27/18. (dlg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE of Settlement between Plaintiff and Windsor Fashions LLC by Michelle Lee (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv1920-GPC-MSB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 11/8/18.(dlg)
October 31, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance Or Withdrawal of Counsel by Alfred De La Cruz on behalf of Windsor Fashions, LLC (De La Cruz, Alfred) QC email, improper format. Attorney should file as a pleading (dlg).
October 31, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Bruce Kass on behalf of Windsor Fashions, LLC (Kass, Dennis)Attorney Dennis Bruce Kass added to party Windsor Fashions, LLC(pty:dft) QC email, improper format. Attorney should file as a pleading(dlg).
October 30, 2018 Filing 99 Joint MOTION to Dismiss T.B. and J.B., Inc. by Michelle Lee. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
October 18, 2018 Filing 98 NOTIFICATION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Sears Holding Corporation and Sears, Roebuck and Co. by Sears, Roebuck and Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition (Sears Holdings Corporation), #2 Exhibit B - Petition (Sears, Roebuck and Co.), #3 Proof of Service)(Drenan, Michael) (jdt).
October 17, 2018 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michelle Lee re #96 Response to Order to Show Cause (Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
October 16, 2018 Filing 96 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Michelle Lee re #94 Order to Show Cause,. (Stilwell, Andrew) QC email, missing certificate of service (dlg).
October 10, 2018 Filing 95 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party by AT&T Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Wofford, Robin) (dlg).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and to Suspend Filing Deadlines. The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing, no later than October 16, 2018, why the Court should not sever all but North County Fair, Westfield, and Customized Tees SD and dismiss the subsequent retail defendants for improper joinder. The Court also orders that any and all filing deadlines are suspended until the resolution of this Order to Show cause. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/10/18.(dlg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 93 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Yankee Candle Company, Inc..(McNulty, Elizabeth)Attorney Elizabeth Vanis McNulty added to party The Yankee Candle Company, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 9, 2018 Filing 92 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michelle Lee, as to Destination Maternity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
October 9, 2018 Filing 91 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant, Oro Gold by Michelle Lee. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
October 8, 2018 Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant Lucky Brand by Michelle Lee. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
October 8, 2018 Filing 89 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Palaz Coffee Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kaplan, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Adam Kaplan added to party Palaz Coffee Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 8, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie Phan on behalf of Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Appearance by Valerie Phan for Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC)(Phan, Valerie)Attorney Valerie Phan added to party Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 8, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie Phan on behalf of Bath & Body Works, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Appearance by Valerie Phan for Bath and Body Works, LLC)(Phan, Valerie)Attorney Valerie Phan added to party Bath & Body Works, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 6, 2018 Filing 86 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant Charlotte Russe, Inc. by Michelle Lee. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
October 5, 2018 Filing 85 Ex Parte MOTION for Hearing to Set a Case Management Conference or, Alternatively, to Set a Briefing Schedule by North County Fair L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Stacey McKee Knight, #3 Table of Contents for Exhibits, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Proof of Service)(Knight, Stacey) (dlg).
October 5, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by North County Fair L.P. re #83 Memorandum of Facts and Contentions of Law filed by North County Fair L.P., #82 Ex Parte MOTION for Hearing to Set a Case Management Conference or, Alternatively, to Set a Briefing Schedule filed by North County Fair L.P. . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Knight, Stacey) (dlg).
October 5, 2018 Filing 83 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 84 *** MEMORANDUM OF FACTS AND CONTENTIONS OF LAW by North County Fair L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Knight, Stacey) (dlg). Modified on 10/9/2018 (dlg).
October 5, 2018 Filing 82 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 84 *** Ex Parte MOTION for Hearing to Set a Case Management Conference or, Alternatively, to Set a Briefing Schedule by North County Fair L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey McKee Knight, #2 Table of Contents for Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Proof of Service)(Knight, Stacey) (dlg). Modified on 10/9/2018 (dlg).
October 4, 2018 Filing 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Starbucks Corporation. (Hurley, Gregory) (dlg).
October 4, 2018 Filing 80 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Starbucks Corporation.(Hurley, Gregory)Attorney Gregory Francis Hurley added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 4, 2018 Filing 79 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Shiekh Shoes, LLC. (Walker, Ryan)Attorney Ryan Phillips Walker added to party Shiekh Shoes, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 4, 2018 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by T-Mobile USA, Inc. re #72 Notice (Other) of Interested Parties (Thomas, Cameron) (dlg).
October 4, 2018 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by T-Mobile USA, Inc. re #71 Answer to Complaint (Thomas, Cameron) (dlg).
October 4, 2018 Filing 76 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Swarovski Retail Ventures LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Pritikin, Nancy)Attorney Nancy E. Pritikin added to party Swarovski Retail Ventures LTD(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 3, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michelle Lee OF SEPHORA USA, INC., (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
October 3, 2018 Filing 74 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michelle Lee, as to The Walking Company Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
October 3, 2018 Filing 73 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michelle Lee, as to Brighton Collectibles Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
October 3, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Thomas, Cameron) QC email, missing certificate of service (dlg).
October 3, 2018 Filing 71 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Thomas, Cameron)Attorney Cameron W. Thomas added to party T-Mobile USA, Inc.(pty:dft) QC email, missing certificate of service (dlg).
October 3, 2018 Filing 70 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Stipulation by Claire's Boutiques, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert S. Galbo, #2 Proof of Service)(Bykerk, Ryan)Attorney Ryan C. Bykerk added to party Claire's Boutiques, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 3, 2018 Filing 69 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michelle Lee, as to Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
October 3, 2018 Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Pacific Sunwear of California, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Villamor, Myra)Attorney Myra B. Villamor added to party Pacific Sunwear of California, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 3, 2018 Filing 67 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ben Bridge-Jeweler, Inc., Helzberg's Diamond Shops, Inc., Pandora Jewelry, LLC, See's Candy Shops, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Drenan, Michael)Attorney Michael D Drenan added to party Ben Bridge-Jeweler, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D Drenan added to party Helzberg's Diamond Shops, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D Drenan added to party Pandora Jewelry, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D Drenan added to party See's Candy Shops, Incorporated(pty:dft)(dlg).
October 3, 2018 Filing 66 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Red Robin International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint)(Sandberg, Katherine)Attorney Katherine P. Sandberg added to party Red Robin International, Inc.(pty:dft) QC email re proposed order (dlg).
October 3, 2018 Filing 65 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Vans, Inc..(Connolly, John)Attorney John G Connolly added to party Vans, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 3, 2018 Filing 64 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to the Complaint by Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Farag, Shareef)Attorney Shareef Farag added to party Genesco, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Shareef Farag added to party Hat World, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 3, 2018 Filing 63 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Francesca's Collections, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kaplan, Matthew)Attorney Matthew I Kaplan added to party Francesca's Collections, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 2, 2018 Filing 62 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Michael Kors Retail, Inc.. (Gehring, Ted)Attorney Ted Allan Gehring added to party Michael Kors Retail, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 2, 2018 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Torrid, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Grunvald, Hayley)Attorney Hayley Singer Grunvald added to party Torrid, LLC(pty:dft) QC EMAIL RE proposed order (dlg).
October 2, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE Of Withdrawal Of: (1) Joint Motion To Extend Time For Defendant C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc. To Respond To Complaint [Ecf No. 56]; And (2) Counsel Of Record For Defendant C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc. by C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc. re #56 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Gao, Kathy) (dlg).
October 1, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Koning on behalf of Aldo U.S. Inc. (Koning, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Koning added to party Aldo U.S. Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
October 1, 2018 Filing 58 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Hot Topic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Medlin, Phillip)Attorney Phillip Medlin added to party Hot Topic, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 57 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, or to Respond to Initial Complaint by Forever 21, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Forever 21, Inc. to Respond to Initial Complaint, #2 Proof of Service Certificate of Service by CM ECF on 09 28 18)(Roller, Amber)Attorney Amber Roller added to party Forever 21, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 56 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 60 *** Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc.. (Gao, Kathy)Attorney Kathy Hua Gao added to party C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg). Modified on 10/3/2018 (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Express Fashion Apparel, LLC. (Gao, Kathy)Attorney Kathy Hua Gao added to party Express Fashion Apparel, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Anntaylor Retail, Inc., Tween Brands, Inc.. (Gao, Kathy)Attorney Kathy Hua Gao added to party Anntaylor Retail, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kathy Hua Gao added to party Tween Brands, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Soma Intimates, LLC, White House Black Market, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kenefick, Matthew)Attorney Matthew S Kenefick added to party Soma Intimates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew S Kenefick added to party White House Black Market, Inc.(pty:dft)(dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Lee. Ben Bridge-Jeweler, Inc. served. (Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Lee. Shiekh Shoes, LLC served. (Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Lee. Fifth Avenue Jewelers & Co., LLC served. (Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Lee. Dorabati Soheila Naghdi served. (Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Lee. Salon House, LLC served. (Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Lee. Palaz Coffee Group, Inc. served. (Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Lee. Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., Soma Intimates, LLC, White House Black Market, Inc. served. (Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Lee. 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc., Anntaylor Retail, Inc., Aveda Experience Centers, Inc., Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc., Brookstone Stores, Inc., Charlotte Russe, Inc., Charming Charlie, LLC, Destination Maternity Corporation, Francesca's Collections, Inc., Genesco, Inc., Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC, Hat World, Inc., Helzberg's Diamond Shops, Inc., Hot Topic, Inc., Lucky Brand Dungarees Stores USA, LLC, Lush Cosmetics, LLC, M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc., Origins Natural Resources, Inc., Pandora Jewelry, LLC, Red Robin International, Inc., Sephora USA, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Swarovski Retail Ventures LTD, T-Mobile USA, Inc., The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The Children's Place, Inc., The Yankee Candle Company, Inc., Torrid, LLC, Tween Brands, Inc., Vans, Inc. served. (Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Lee. AT&T Corp, Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc., Aldo U.S. Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., Apple, Inc., Bath & Body Works Direct, Inc., Bath & Body Works, LLC, C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc., Express Fashion Apparel, LLC, Foot Locker Retail, Inc.(a New York Corporation), Foot Locker Retail, Inc.(a New York corporation), Forever 21, Inc., Gamestop, Inc., H & M Hennes & Mauritz L.P., Hollister Co. California, LLC, J.C. Penney Properties, Inc., Jewelry Repair Enterprises, Inc., Luxottica Retail North America, Inc., Michael Kors Retail, Inc., New Rue21, LLC, Old Navy, LLC, Payless Shoesource, Inc., Sears, Roebuck and Co., Sherwood Management Co., Inc., Spencer Gifts LLC, Sterling Jewelers, Inc., Tapestry, Inc., Target Corporation, The Gap, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), Windsor Fashions, LLC, Zale Delaware, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Zumiez, Inc. served. (Stilwell, Andrew) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 43 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by The Children's Place, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Grunvald, Hayley)Attorney Hayley Singer Grunvald added to party The Children's Place, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead by M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.. (Sipprelle, Keith)Attorney Keith Andrew Sipprelle added to party M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 28, 2018 Filing 41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint by The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc.. (Warren, Tracy)Attorney Tracy Anne Warren added to party The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 27, 2018 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by J.C. Penney Properties, Inc..(Hunt, Kathleen)Attorney Kathleen A Hunt added to party J.C. Penney Properties, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #13 #14 #15 #18 #20 #21 #24 #25 #26 #27 #28 #30 #31 #32 #33 #34 #35 #36 Extensions of Time to File Answer for Twenty-Three Defendants and Directing Plaintiff to File Proof of Service. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/27/18. (dlg)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting #22 Motion to Dismiss Verizon Wireless Services, LLC Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/27/18. (dlg)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting #23 Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/27/18. (dlg)
September 27, 2018 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Extension of Time to Move or Otherwise Plead by Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc., Charming Charlie, LLC, Pandora Jewelry, LLC. (Micheli, Steven)Attorney Steven A Micheli added to party Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven A Micheli added to party Charming Charlie, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Steven A Micheli added to party Pandora Jewelry, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 26, 2018 Filing 35 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint by Gamestop, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith Rozanski, #2 Exhibit A)(Rozanski, Keith)Attorney Keith M. Rozanski added to party Gamestop, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Keith M. Rozanski added to party Nordstrom, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 26, 2018 Filing 34 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sears, Roebuck and Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel in Support of Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Sears Holdings Management Corp., #2 Proof of Service)(Drenan, Michael)Attorney Michael D Drenan added to party Sears, Roebuck and Co.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 26, 2018 Filing 33 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, by C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel in Support of Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time for Defendant C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc. to Respond to Complaint, #2 Proof of Service)(Drenan, Michael)Attorney Michael D Drenan added to party C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 25, 2018 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bath & Body Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Wofford, Robin)Attorney Robin Assaf Wofford added to party Bath & Body Works, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 25, 2018 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by New Rue21, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Martinez, David)Attorney David Martinez added to party New Rue21, LLC(pty:dft) QC email re proposed order (dlg).
September 25, 2018 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Wofford, Robin)Attorney Robin Assaf Wofford added to party Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 25, 2018 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. re #28 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or respond to Complaint (Schwartz, Robert) (dlg).
September 25, 2018 Filing 28 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or respond to Complaint by Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of ex parte motion for extension of time)(Schwartz, Robert)Attorney Robert Ashley Schwartz added to party Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 24, 2018 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Sherwood Management Co., Inc.. (Seroussi, Ruth)Attorney Ruth Lileah Seroussi added to party Sherwood Management Co., Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 24, 2018 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Spencer Gifts LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Buddingh, Jan)Attorney Jan K Buddingh, JR added to party Spencer Gifts LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 24, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Windsor Fashions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification As To Interested Parties, #2 Proposed Order)(De La Cruz, Alfred)Attorney Alfred De La Cruz added to party Windsor Fashions, LLC(pty:dft) QC email re proposed order(dlg).
September 24, 2018 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants Luxottica Retail North America, Inc. and Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Luxottica Retail North America, Inc., Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC. (Stoll, Richard)Attorney Richard Giles Stoll added to party Luxottica Retail North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Giles Stoll added to party Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 24, 2018 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint Adding ABC Phones as Defendant by Michelle Lee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Stilwell, Andrew)QC email re proposed order (dlg).
September 24, 2018 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Verizon Wireless by Michelle Lee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Stilwell, Andrew) QC email re proposed order (dlg).
September 24, 2018 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AT&T Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Wofford, Robin)Attorney Robin Assaf Wofford added to party AT&T Corp(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 24, 2018 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Aldo U.S. Inc.. (Zollar, Blake) (dlg).
September 24, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document by Aldo U.S. Inc. re #16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Zollar, Blake) (dlg).
September 24, 2018 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Extension of Time to Move or Otherwise Plead by Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc., Hollister Co. California, LLC. (Micheli, Steven)Attorney Steven A Micheli added to party Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven A Micheli added to party Hollister Co. California, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Joint #12 Motion to Extend Time for Answer Apple, Inc. to Respond to Complaint to October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/24/18. (dlg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 16 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 19 *** Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aldo U.S. Inc.. (Zollar, Blake)Attorney Blake M. Zollar added to party Aldo U.S. Inc.(pty:dft) qc email, document not signed. Attorney should withdraw and refile with proper signature (dlg). Modified on 9/25/2018 (dlg).
September 21, 2018 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Payless Shoesource, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Wade, Ian)Attorney Ian Tracy Wade added to party Payless Shoesource, Inc.(pty:dft) qc email re attached proposed order (dlg).
September 21, 2018 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by North County Fair L.P.. (Knight, Stacey)Attorney Stacey McKee Knight added to party North County Fair L.P.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Old Navy, LLC, The Gap, Inc.. (Gao, Kathy)Attorney Kathy Hua Gao added to party Old Navy, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kathy Hua Gao added to party The Gap, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Doolin, Michelle)Attorney Michelle C Doolin added to party Apple, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Foot Locker Retail to Respond to Complaint on or before October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/19/18. (dlg)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Foot Locker Retail, Inc.(a New York Corporation), Foot Locker Retail, Inc.(a New York corporation). (Gold, Kate)Attorney Kate S. Gold added to party Foot Locker Retail, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kate S. Gold added to party Foot Locker Retail, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/18/18. (dlg)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Joint #6 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The deadline for the Defendants Zale Delaware, Inc. and Sterling Jewelers Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/17/18. (dlg)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Zumiez, Inc.. (McClellan, Edson)Attorney Edson K McClellan added to party Zumiez, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Sterling Jewelers, Inc., Zale Delaware, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Eisen, Mark)Attorney Mark S. Eisen added to party Sterling Jewelers, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark S. Eisen added to party Zale Delaware, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Brookstone Stores, Inc. by Brookstone Stores, Inc. (Bouslog, Matthew) (dlg).
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18-cv-1920-GPC-RBB.(no document attached) (tcf)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv1920-MMA(RBB). (rmc)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc., AT&T Corp, Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc., Aldo U.S. Inc., Alpha 3 Lima, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., Anntaylor Retail, Inc., Apple, Inc., Athleisure, Inc., Audeo Charter School, Aveda Experience Centers, Inc., Bandex, LLC, Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc., Bath & Body Works Direct, Inc., Bath & Body Works, LLC, Ben Bridge-Jeweler, Inc., Brighton Collectibles Holdings, Inc., Brooks Tone Stores, Inc., C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc., Charlotte Russe, Inc., Charming Charlie, LLC, Claire's Boutiques, Inc., Cotton On USA, Inc., Currency Exchange International, Corp., Customized Teez SD, D.S.A. Sports, Inc., Destination Maternity Corporation, Doe 1, Doe 2, Doe 3, Does 4 through 10, EM Jewelry & Design, LLC, Escondido Pets, LLC, Express Fashion Apparel, LLC, Fabulous Nails & Spa, LLC, Fifth Avenue Jewelers & Co., LLC, Foot Locker Retail, Inc.(a New York Corporation), Foot Locker Retail, Inc.(a New York corporation), Forever 21, Inc., Francesca's Collections, Inc., Gamestop, Inc., Genesco, Inc., Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC, H & M Hennes & Mauritz L.P., Hat World, Inc., Helzberg's Diamond Shops, Inc., Hollister Co. California, LLC, Hot Topic, Inc., Ichi Trading Corporation, J.C. Penney Properties, Inc., Jayney Corp., Jewelry Repair Enterprises, Inc., K Shoes Co, Kalya Enterprises, Inc., Kevin Jewelers, Inc., Lahay Investments, LLC, Lorna Jane USA, Inc., Lucky Brand Dungarees Stores USA, LLC, Lush Cosmetics, LLC, Luxottica Retail North America, Inc., M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc., Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc., Michael Kors Retail, Inc., Hakeem Milbes, Miniso Depot Escondido, LLC, Dorabati Soheila Naghdi, New Rue21, LLC, Nordstrom, Inc., North County Fair L.P., Old Navy, LLC, Origins Natural Resources, Inc., Oro Gold Cosmetics, Inc., Pacific Sunwear of California, LLC, Palaz Coffee Group, Inc., Pandora Jewelry, LLC, Payless Shoesource, Inc., Q Apparel, Inc., Red Robin International, Inc., Royal Maui Jewelers, Inc., Rudera 3 Corporation, Inc., SS&S Investments, LLC, Salon House, LLC, Sears, Roebuck and Co., See's Candy Shops, Incorporated, Sephora USA, Inc., Sherwood Management Co., Inc., Shiekh Shoes, LLC, Shoe Palace Corporation, Soma Intimates, LLC, Spencer Gifts LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Sterling Jewelers, Inc., Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC, Swarovski Retail Ventures LTD, T-Mobile USA, Inc., T.B. & J.B., INC., TPP Acquisition, Inc., Tapestry, Inc., Target Corporation, Ten Perfect Nails, Inc., The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The Children's Place, Inc., The Computerized Cobbler, The Gap, Inc., The Walking Company Holdings, Inc., The Yankee Candle Company, Inc., Things Remembered, Inc., Torrid, LLC, Trinity Retail Unlimited, LLC, Tween Brands, Inc., Vans, Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), Westfield America GP, LLC, White House Black Market, Inc., Windsor Fashions, LLC, Zale Delaware, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Zumiez, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11571032.), filed by Michelle Lee. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1920-MMA-NLS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Stilwell, Andrew)(jrm) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. North County Fair L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charming Charlie, LLC
Represented By: Steven A Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Robin International, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine P. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athleisure, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Jewelers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Rue21, LLC
Represented By: David Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brighton Collectibles Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron W. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helzberg's Diamond Shops, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D Drenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & M Hennes & Mauritz L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy, LLC
Represented By: Kathy Hua Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Brand Dungarees Stores USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle C Doolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aveda Experience Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.S.A. Sports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabulous Nails & Spa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Sunwear of California, LLC
Represented By: Myra B. Villamor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francesca's Collections, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew I Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorabati Soheila Naghdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck and Co.
Represented By: Michael D Drenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foot Locker Retail, Inc.
Represented By: Kate S. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walking Company Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vans, Inc.
Represented By: John G Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Maui Jewelers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oro Gold Cosmetics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudera 3 Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Fashion Apparel, LLC
Represented By: Kathy Hua Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayney Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy Hua Gao
Represented By: Michael D Drenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwood Management Co., Inc.
Represented By: Ruth Lileah Seroussi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anntaylor Retail, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy Hua Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hat World, Inc.
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pandora Jewelry, LLC
Represented By: Michael D Drenan
Represented By: Steven A Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPP Acquisition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha 3 Lima, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gamestop, Inc.
Represented By: Keith M. Rozanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kors Retail, Inc.
Represented By: Ted Allan Gehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Jewelers, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Eisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zale Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Eisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sephora USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp
Represented By: Robin Assaf Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Shoes Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever 21, Inc.
Represented By: Amber Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Ashley Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Origins Natural Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalya Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zumiez, Inc.
Represented By: Edson K McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ichi Trading Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesco, Inc.
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ten Perfect Nails, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrid, LLC
Represented By: Hayley Singer Grunvald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swarovski Retail Ventures LTD
Represented By: Nancy E. Pritikin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Customized Teez SD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See's Candy Shops, Incorporated
Represented By: Michael D Drenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hakeem Milbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audeo Charter School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC
Represented By: Robin Assaf Wofford
Represented By: Valerie Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Computerized Cobbler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxottica Retail North America, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Giles Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Bridge-Jeweler, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D Drenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palaz Coffee Group, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.B. & J.B., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salon House, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bath & Body Works, LLC
Represented By: Robin Assaf Wofford
Represented By: Valerie Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Topic, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Andrew Medlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bath & Body Works Direct, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Andrew Sipprelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Gifts LLC
Represented By: Jan K Buddingh, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Eagle Outfitters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Destination Maternity Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollister Co. California, LLC
Represented By: Steven A Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Avenue Jewelers & Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soma Intimates, LLC
Represented By: Matthew S Kenefick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miniso Depot Escondido, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency Exchange International, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Russe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Things Remembered, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lush Cosmetics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White House Black Market, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S Kenefick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Penney Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen A Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SS&S Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Children's Place, Inc.
Represented By: Hayley Singer Grunvald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna Jane USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gap, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy Hua Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 4 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Retail Unlimited, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cotton On USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Fashions, LLC
Represented By: Alfred De La Cruz
Represented By: Dennis Bruce Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bandex, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q Apparel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiekh Shoes, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Phillips Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc.
Represented By: Keith M. Rozanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North County Fair L.P.
Represented By: Stacey McKee Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payless Shoesource, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Tracy Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldo U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Blake M. Zollar
Represented By: Andrew Koning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escondido Pets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EM Jewelry & Design, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Yankee Candle Company, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Vanis McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tween Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy Hua Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Anne Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC
Represented By: Richard Giles Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewelry Repair Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoe Palace Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lahay Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tapestry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks Tone Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire's Boutiques, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan C. Bykerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield America GP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookstone Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White House Black Market
Represented By: Matthew S Kenefick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Origins Natural Resources, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Origins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gamestop, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as GameStop
Represented By: Keith M. Rozanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookstone Stores, Inc. a New Hampshire corporation doing business as Brookstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hat World, Inc. a Minnesota corporation doing business as Lids
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 3 an unknown business entity doing business as Vine Vera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brighton Collectibles Holdings, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Brighton Collectibles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lush Cosmetics, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Handmade Cosmetics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Jewelers, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Kay Jewelers
Represented By: Mark S. Eisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc. a Washington corporation doing business as Nordstrom
Represented By: Keith M. Rozanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as T-Mobile
Represented By: Cameron W. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Bridge-Jeweler, Inc. a Washington corporation doing business as Ben Bridge Jewelers
Represented By: Michael D Drenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zumiez, Inc. a Washington corporation doing business as Zumiez
Represented By: Edson K McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Apple Store
Represented By: Michelle C Doolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miniso Depot Escondido, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Miniso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escondido Pets, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Escondido Pets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna Jane USA, Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Lorna Jane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pandora Jewelry, LLC a Maryland limited liability company doing business as Pandora
Represented By: Michael D Drenan
Represented By: Steven A Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as M.A.C. Cosmetics
Represented By: Keith Andrew Sipprelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabulous Nails & Spa, LLC a California corporation doing business as Fabulous Nails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. a California corporation doing business as 24 Hour Fitness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kors Retail, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Michael Kors
Represented By: Ted Allan Gehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francesca's Collections, Inc. a Texas corporation doing business as Francesca's
Represented By: Matthew I Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Things Remembered, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Things Remembered
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Customized Teez SD a California Corporation doing business as Customized Teez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bath & Body Works Direct, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Bath & Body Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. a New York corporation doing business as Macy's
Represented By: Robert Ashley Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Sunwear of California, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as PacSun
Represented By: Myra B. Villamor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audeo Charter School a California corporation doing business as Audeo Charter School II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Services, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Verizon Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Destination Maternity Corporation a Delaware corporation doing business as Motherhood Maternity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 2 an unknown business entity doing business as GNC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ten Perfect Nails, Inc. a California corporation doing business as 10 Perfect Nails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayney Corp. a California corporation doing business as Buzzes N' Beehives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EM Jewelry & Design, LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as as EM Jewelry + Design
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tapestry, Inc. a Maryland Corporation doing business as Coach Leather Ware California doing business as Coach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Old Navy
Represented By: Kathy Hua Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudera 3 Corporation, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Fragranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Victoria's Secret
Represented By: Robin Assaf Wofford
Represented By: Valerie Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sephora USA, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Sephora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.B. & J.B., INC. a California corporation doing business as Hallmark Cards & Gifts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q Apparel, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Q Fashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as bareMinerals
Represented By: Steven A Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lahay Investments, LLC a Nevada limited liability company doing business as Lionesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Russe, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Charlotte Russe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Avenue Jewelers & Co., LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Fifth Avenue Jewelers & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxottica Retail North America, Inc. an Ohio corporation doing business as LensCrafters
Represented By: Richard Giles Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwood Management Co., Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Daniel's Jewelers
Represented By: Ruth Lileah Seroussi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gap, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Gap
Represented By: Kathy Hua Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zale Delaware, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Piercing Pagoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cotton On USA, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Cotton On
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc. an Ohio Corporation doing business as Abercrombie & Fitch
Represented By: Steven A Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Topic, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Hot Topic
Represented By: Phillip Andrew Medlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Yankee Candle Company, Inc. a Massachusetts corporation doing business as Yankee Candle Co.
Represented By: Elizabeth Vanis McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Children's Place, Inc. which will do business in California as TCP - The Children's Place, Inc., a Delaware corporation doing business as The Children's Place
Represented By: Hayley Singer Grunvald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesco, Inc. a Tennessee corporation doing business as Journeys
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athleisure, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Sun Diego Boardshops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollister Co. California, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Hollister Co.
Represented By: Steven A Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soma Intimates, LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Soma
Represented By: Matthew S Kenefick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Gifts LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Spencer's
Represented By: Jan K Buddingh, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPP Acquisition, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Picture People
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See's Candy Shops, Incorporated a California corporation doing business as See's Candies
Represented By: Michael D Drenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency Exchange International, Corp. a Florida corporation doing business as Currency Exchange International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palaz Coffee Group, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Elixir - Espresso & Wine Bar
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Gymboree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrid, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Torrid
Represented By: Hayley Singer Grunvald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Maui Jewelers, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Royal Maui Jewelers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Rue21, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Rue21
Represented By: David Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Jewelers, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Kevin Jewelers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1 an unknown business entity doing business as Allegiance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Computerized Cobbler a California corporation doing business as Computerized Cobbler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walking Company Holdings, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as The Walking Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bath & Body Works, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as White Barn Candle Company
Represented By: Robin Assaf Wofford
Represented By: Valerie Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Retail Unlimited, LLC a Nevada limited liability company doing business as Sweet Factory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oro Gold Cosmetics, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Oro Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foot Locker Retail, Inc. a New York corporation doing business as Kids Foot Locker
Represented By: Kate S. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Penney Properties, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as JC Penney
Represented By: Kathleen A Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Shoes Co a California corporation doing business as K Shoes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anntaylor Retail, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Loft
Represented By: Kathy Hua Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalya Enterprises, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Kalya's Silver & Body Jewelry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Fashion Apparel, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as Express
Represented By: Kathy Hua Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorabati Soheila Naghdi an individual doing business as Hair Studio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SS&S Investments, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as A to Z Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ichi Trading Corporation a California corporation doing business as Tokyo Japanese Lifestyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. a California corporation doing business as The Cheesecake Factory
Represented By: Tracy Anne Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha 3 Lima, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Street Comer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire's Boutiques, Inc. a Colorado corporation doing business as Claire's doing business as Icing
Represented By: Ryan C. Bykerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Eagle Outfitters, Inc. an Ohio Corporation doing business as American Eagle Outfitters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vans, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Vans
Represented By: John G Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldo U.S. Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Aldo
Represented By: Blake M. Zollar
Represented By: Andrew Koning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helzberg's Diamond Shops, Inc. a Missouri corporation doing business as Helzberg Diamonds
Represented By: Michael D Drenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc. a Pennsylvania Corporation doing business as Clarks
Represented By: Kathy Hua Gao
Represented By: Michael D Drenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bandex, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Just in Time
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation a Washington corporation doing business as Starbucks
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zale Delaware, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Zales Jewelers
Represented By: Mark S. Eisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tween Brands, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Justice
Represented By: Kathy Hua Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swarovski Retail Ventures LTD a Rhode Island corporation doing business as Swarovski
Represented By: Nancy E. Pritikin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payless Shoesource, Inc. a Missouri corporation doing business as Payless Shoesource
Represented By: Ian Tracy Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hakeem Milbes an individual doing business as Men's District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewelry Repair Enterprises, Inc. a Pennsylvania Corporation doing business as Fast Fix Jewelry & Watch Repair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aveda Experience Centers, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Aveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charming Charlie, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Charming Charlie
Represented By: Steven A Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiekh Shoes, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Shiekh Shoes
Represented By: Ryan Phillips Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoe Palace Corporation a California corporation doing business as Shoe Palace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.S.A. Sports, Inc. a California limited liability company doing business as Sports Fever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foot Locker Retail, Inc. a New York Corporation doing business as Foot Locker
Represented By: Kate S. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & M Hennes & Mauritz L.P. a New York limited partnership doing business as H&M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salon House, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Brows n More
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Pink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Fashions, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Windsor
Represented By: Alfred De La Cruz
Represented By: Dennis Bruce Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Brand Dungarees Stores USA, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Lucky Brand Jeans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC an Ohio limited liability company doing business as Sunglass Hut
Represented By: Richard Giles Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation a Minnesota corporation doing business as Target
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck and Co. a New York corporation doing business as Sears
Represented By: Michael D Drenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp a New York Corporation doing business as AT&T
Represented By: Robin Assaf Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Robin International, Inc. which will do business in California as Red Robin Burger and Spirits Emporiums, a Nevada corporation doing business as Red Robin Gourmet Burgers
Represented By: Katherine P. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Lee
Represented By: Andrew R Stilwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?