State of Delaware v. BP America Inc, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: STATE OF DELAWARE, ex rel. Kathleen Jennings, Attorney General of the State of Delaware
Defendant / Appellant: BP AMERICA INC, BP PLC, CHEVRON CORP, CHEVRON USA INC, CONOCOPHILLIPS, CONOCOPHILLIPS CO, PHILLIPS 66, PHILLIPS 66 CO, EXXON MOBIL CORP, EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP, XTO ENERGY INC, HESS CORP, MARATHON OIL CORP, MARATHON PETROLEUM CORP, MARATHON PETROLEUM CO LP, SPEEDWAY LLC, MURPHY OIL CORP, MURPHY USA, ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC, SHELL OIL CO, CITGO PETROLEUM CORP, TOTAL SA, OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORP, DEVON ENERGY CORP, APACHE CORP, CNX RESOURCES CORP, CONSOL ENERGY INC, OVINTIV INC, AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE and TOTALENERGIES MARKETING USA INC
Case Number: 22-1096
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 120 ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Shell Oil Co. [22-1096] (DCF) [Entered: 03/17/2022 04:53 PM]
March 17, 2022 Filing 119 ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Royal Dutch Shell PLC. [22-1096] (DCF) [Entered: 03/17/2022 04:52 PM]
March 17, 2022 Filing 118 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney David C. Frederick, Esq. for Appellants Royal Dutch Shell PLC and Shell Oil Co Notice of Change of Party Names. Certificate of Service dated 03/17/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-1096] (DCF) [Entered: 03/17/2022 04:51 PM]
March 17, 2022 Filing 117 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants American Petroleum Institute, Apache Corp, BP America Inc, BP plc, CNX Resources Corp, Chevron Corp, Chevron USA Inc, Citgo Petroleum Corp, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Co, Consol Energy Inc, Devon Energy Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, ExxonMobil Oil Corp, Hess Corp, Marathon Oil Corp, Marathon Petroleum Co LP, Marathon Petroleum Corp, Murphy Oil Corp, Murphy USA, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Ovintiv Inc, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Co, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Co, Speedway LLC, Total SA, TotalEnergies Marketing USA Inc and XTO Energy Inc - Joint Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: Index + 9 volumes (EAF) [Entered: 03/17/2022 01:23 PM]
March 17, 2022 Filing 116 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants American Petroleum Institute, Apache Corp, BP America Inc, BP plc, CNX Resources Corp, Chevron Corp, Chevron USA Inc, Citgo Petroleum Corp, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Co, Consol Energy Inc, Devon Energy Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, ExxonMobil Oil Corp, Hess Corp, Marathon Oil Corp, Marathon Petroleum Co LP, Marathon Petroleum Corp, Murphy Oil Corp, Murphy USA, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Ovintiv Inc, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Co, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Co, Speedway LLC, Total SA, TotalEnergies Marketing USA Inc and XTO Energy Inc - Brief with Addendum attached. Copies: 7. (SJB) [Entered: 03/17/2022 11:35 AM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 115 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Chevron Corp and Chevron USA Inc., American Petroleum Institute, Apache Corp, BP America Inc, BP plc, CNX Resources Corp, Citgo Petroleum Corp, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Co, Consol Energy Inc, Devon Energy Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, ExxonMobil Oil Corp, Hess Corp, Marathon Oil Corp, Marathon Petroleum Co LP, Marathon Petroleum Corp, Murphy Oil Corp, Murphy USA, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Ovintiv Inc, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Co, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Co, Speedway LLC, Total SA, TotalEnergies Marketing USA and XTO Energy Inc. Certificate of service dated 03/15/2022 by ECF. [22-1096][Edited docket text]--[Edited 03/16/2022 by MCW] (TJB) [Entered: 03/15/2022 09:07 PM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 114 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Chevron Corp and Chevron USA Inc., American Petroleum Institute, Apache Corp, BP America Inc., BP plc, CNX Resources Corp., Citgo Petroleum Corp, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Co, Consol Energy Inc, Devon Energy Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, ExxonMobil Oil Corp, Hess Corp, Marathon Oil Corp, Marathon Petroleum Co LP, Marathon Petroleum Corp, Murphy Oil Corp, Murphy USA, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Ovintiv Inc, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Co, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Co, Speedway LLC, Total SA, TotalEnergies Marketing USA Inc and XTO Energy Inc. Certificate of Service dated 03/15/2022 by ECF. [22-1096][Edited docket text]--[Edited 03/16/2022 by MCW] (TJB) [Entered: 03/15/2022 07:54 PM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 113 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrea E. Neuman on behalf of Appellant(s) Chevron Corp. and Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. [22-1096] (AEN) [Entered: 03/15/2022 03:29 PM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 112 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William E. Thomson on behalf of Appellant(s) Chevron Corp. and Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. [22-1096] (WET) [Entered: 03/15/2022 03:22 PM]
March 14, 2022 Filing 111 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephanie D. Biehl on behalf of Appellee(s) State of Delaware. [22-1096] (SDB) [Entered: 03/14/2022 03:31 PM]
March 14, 2022 Filing 110 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Quentin C. Karpilow on behalf of Appellee(s) State of Delaware. [22-1096] (QCK) [Entered: 03/14/2022 03:28 PM]
March 14, 2022 Filing 109 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David M. Morrell on behalf of Appellant(s) CNX Resources Corporation. [22-1096] (DMM) [Entered: 03/14/2022 01:07 PM]
March 2, 2022 Filing 108 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alexandra M. Ewing on behalf of Appellant(s) Apache Corporation. [22-1096] (AE) [Entered: 03/02/2022 03:12 PM]
March 2, 2022 Filing 107 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alexandra M. Ewing on behalf of Appellant(s) TotalEnergies Marketing USA, Inc. and Total S.A.. [22-1096] (AE) [Entered: 03/02/2022 03:10 PM]
February 24, 2022 Filing 106 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joseph J. Bellew on behalf of Appellant(s) MURPHY OIL. [22-1096] (JJB) [Entered: 02/24/2022 02:56 PM]
February 24, 2022 Filing 105 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joseph J. Bellew on behalf of Appellant(s) Hess Corp.. [22-1096] (JJB) [Entered: 02/24/2022 02:54 PM]
February 8, 2022 Filing 104 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Benjamin Aguinaga on behalf of Appellant(s) CNX Resources Corporation. [22-1096] (JBA) [Entered: 02/08/2022 02:54 PM]
February 8, 2022 Filing 103 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Scott Janoe on behalf of Appellant(s) Hess Corporation, Murphy Oil Corporation. [22-1096] (JSJ) [Entered: 02/08/2022 09:48 AM]
February 6, 2022 Filing 102 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christian Douglas Wright on behalf of Appellee(s) State of Delaware. [22-1096] (CDW) [Entered: 02/06/2022 08:23 AM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 101 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Shannon S. Broome on behalf of Appellant(s) Marathon Petroleum Company LP; Marathon Petroleum Corporation; Speedway LLC. [22-1096] (SSB) [Entered: 02/03/2022 02:36 PM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 100 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Consol Energy Inc. [22-1096] (KTS) [Entered: 02/03/2022 02:17 PM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 99 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of Appellant(s) ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 and Phillips 66 Company. [22-1096] (AMJ) [Entered: 02/03/2022 01:21 PM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 98 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants American Petroleum Institute, Apache Corp, BP America Inc, BP plc, CNX Resources Corp, Chevron Corp, Chevron USA Inc, Citgo Petroleum Corp, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Co, Consol Energy Inc, Devon Energy Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, ExxonMobil Oil Corp, Hess Corp, Marathon Oil Corp, Marathon Petroleum Co LP, Marathon Petroleum Corp, Murphy Oil Corp, Murphy USA, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Ovintiv Inc, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Co, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Co, Speedway LLC, Total SA, TotalEnergies Marketing USA Inc and XTO Energy Inc due on or before 03/15/2022. Appendix due on or before 03/15/2022. (SLC) [Entered: 02/03/2022 08:42 AM]
February 2, 2022 Filing 97 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael F. Healy on behalf of Appellant(s) Ovintiv, Inc.. [22-1096] (MFH) [Entered: 02/02/2022 04:41 PM]
February 2, 2022 Filing 96 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew K. Edling on behalf of Appellee(s) State of Delaware. [22-1096] (MKE) [Entered: 02/02/2022 01:36 PM]
February 2, 2022 Filing 95 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey L. Moyer on behalf of Appellant(s) Occidental Petroleum Corporation. [22-1096] (JLM) [Entered: 02/02/2022 11:48 AM]
February 2, 2022 Filing 94 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert P. Reznick on behalf of Appellant(s) Marathon Oil Company. [22-1096] (RPR) [Entered: 02/02/2022 11:07 AM]
February 2, 2022 Filing 93 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Apache Corp. [22-1096] (RWW) [Entered: 02/02/2022 09:33 AM]
February 2, 2022 Filing 92 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert W. Whetzel on behalf of Appellant(s) Apache Corporation. [22-1096] (RWW) [Entered: 02/02/2022 09:32 AM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 91 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Citgo Petroleum Corp. [22-1096] (NPE) [Entered: 02/01/2022 06:31 PM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 90 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert E. Dunn on behalf of Appellant(s) CITGO Petroleum Corporation. [22-1096] (RED) [Entered: 02/01/2022 06:29 PM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 89 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lisa S. Meyer on behalf of Appellant(s) CITGO Petroleum Corporation. [22-1096] (LSM) [Entered: 02/01/2022 06:27 PM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 88 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Pamela R. Hanebutt on behalf of Appellant(s) CITGO Petroleum Corporation. [22-1096] (PRH) [Entered: 02/01/2022 06:25 PM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 87 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nathan P. Eimer on behalf of Appellant(s) CITGO Petroleum Corporation. [22-1096] (NPE) [Entered: 02/01/2022 06:23 PM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 86 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Chevron Corp and Chevron USA Inc advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [22-1096] (TJB) [Entered: 02/01/2022 02:57 PM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 85 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Chevron Corp and Chevron USA Inc. [22-1096] (TJB) [Entered: 02/01/2022 02:54 PM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 84 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Chevron Corp and Chevron USA Inc. [22-1096] (TJB) [Entered: 02/01/2022 02:52 PM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 83 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Marathon Oil Corp. [22-1096] (MAB) [Entered: 02/01/2022 11:07 AM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 82 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael A. Barlow on behalf of Appellant(s) Marathon Oil Corporation. [22-1096] (MAB) [Entered: 02/01/2022 11:02 AM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 81 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant TotalEnergies Marketing USA Inc. [22-1096] (RWW) [Entered: 02/01/2022 10:06 AM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 80 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Total SA. [22-1096] (RWW) [Entered: 02/01/2022 10:05 AM]
January 31, 2022 Filing 79 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Speedway LLC. [22-1096] (SPR) [Entered: 01/31/2022 02:09 PM]
January 31, 2022 Filing 78 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Marathon Petroleum Corp. [22-1096] (SPR) [Entered: 01/31/2022 02:08 PM]
January 31, 2022 Filing 77 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Marathon Petroleum Co LP. [22-1096] (SPR) [Entered: 01/31/2022 02:05 PM]
January 31, 2022 Filing 76 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Shawn Patrick Regan on behalf of Appellant(s) Marathon Petroleum Company LP; Marathon Petroleum Corporation; Speedway LLC. [22-1096] (SPR) [Entered: 01/31/2022 01:59 PM]
January 31, 2022 Filing 75 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant XTO Energy Inc. [22-1096] (KKS) [Entered: 01/31/2022 11:23 AM]
January 31, 2022 Filing 74 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Rogers on behalf of Appellant(s) Murphy USA Inc.. [22-1096] (DBR) [Entered: 01/31/2022 09:34 AM]
January 31, 2022 Filing 73 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Murphy USA. [22-1096] (TLD) [Entered: 01/31/2022 09:31 AM]
January 31, 2022 Filing 72 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Tristan L. Duncan on behalf of Appellant(s) Murphy USA Inc.. [22-1096] (TLD) [Entered: 01/31/2022 09:29 AM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 71 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Occidental Petroleum Corp. [22-1096] (KJO) [Entered: 01/28/2022 06:26 PM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 70 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Vanessa A. Lavely on behalf of Appellant(s) Occidental Petroleum Corporation. [22-1096] (VL) [Entered: 01/28/2022 05:47 PM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 69 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kevin J. Orsini on behalf of Appellant(s) Occidental Petroleum Corporation. [22-1096] (KJO) [Entered: 01/28/2022 05:13 PM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 68 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William T. Marks on behalf of Appellant(s) XTO Energy Inc.. [22-1096] (WTM) [Entered: 01/28/2022 11:21 AM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 67 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel J. Toal on behalf of Appellant(s) XTO Energy Inc.. [22-1096] (DJT) [Entered: 01/28/2022 11:17 AM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 66 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Theodore V. Wells, Jr. on behalf of Appellant(s) XTO Energy Inc.. [22-1096] (TVW) [Entered: 01/28/2022 11:14 AM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 65 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kannon K. Shanmugam on behalf of Appellant(s) XTO Energy Inc.. [22-1096] (KKS) [Entered: 01/28/2022 11:11 AM]
January 27, 2022 Filing 64 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Antoinette D. Hubbard on behalf of Appellant(s) Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Speedway LLC. [22-1096] (ADH) [Entered: 01/27/2022 04:33 PM]
January 27, 2022 Filing 63 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael L. Fox on behalf of Appellant(s) Ovintiv, Inc.. [22-1096] (MLF) [Entered: 01/27/2022 11:27 AM]
January 27, 2022 Filing 62 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Blake Rohrbacher on behalf of Appellant(s) TotalEnergies Marketing USA, Inc. and Total S.A.. [22-1096] (BKR) [Entered: 01/27/2022 11:08 AM]
January 27, 2022 Filing 61 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert W. Whetzel on behalf of Appellant(s) TotalEnergies Marketing USA, Inc. and Total S.A.. [22-1096] (RWW) [Entered: 01/27/2022 11:02 AM]
January 26, 2022 Filing 60 Attorney Bar status modified for Victor M. Sher, Esq. for State of Delaware. Status is now active. (TMK) [Entered: 01/27/2022 09:03 AM]
January 26, 2022 Filing 59 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David C. Kiernan on behalf of Appellant(s) CNX Resources Corporation. [22-1096] (DCK) [Entered: 01/26/2022 06:16 PM]
January 26, 2022 Filing 58 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Honor R. Costello on behalf of Appellant(s) CONSOL Energy Inc.. [22-1096] (HRC) [Entered: 01/26/2022 11:11 AM]
January 26, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney Victor M. Sher, Esq. for Appellee State of Delaware. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 02/09/2022. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. (TMK) [Entered: 01/26/2022 10:16 AM]
January 25, 2022 Filing 56 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Ovintiv Inc. [22-1096] (MMW) [Entered: 01/25/2022 03:40 PM]
January 25, 2022 Filing 55 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mackenzie M. Wrobel on behalf of Appellant(s) Ovintiv, Inc.. [22-1096] (MMW) [Entered: 01/25/2022 03:35 PM]
January 25, 2022 Filing 54 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant CNX Resources Corp. [22-1096] (NJF) [Entered: 01/25/2022 02:49 PM]
January 25, 2022 Filing 53 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas G. Hungar on behalf of Appellant(s) Chevron Corp. and Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. [22-1096] (TGH) [Entered: 01/25/2022 02:44 PM]
January 25, 2022 Filing 52 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Chevron USA Inc. [22-1096] (TJB) [Entered: 01/25/2022 02:41 PM]
January 25, 2022 Filing 51 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Chevron Corp. [22-1096] (TJB) [Entered: 01/25/2022 02:40 PM]
January 25, 2022 Filing 50 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. on behalf of Appellant(s) Chevron Corp. and Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. [22-1096] (TJB) [Entered: 01/25/2022 02:38 PM]
January 25, 2022 Filing 49 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Tracy A. Roman on behalf of Appellant(s) CONSOL Energy Inc.. [22-1096] (TAR) [Entered: 01/25/2022 10:47 AM]
January 25, 2022 Filing 48 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kathleen Taylor Sooy on behalf of Appellant(s) CONSOL Energy Inc.. [22-1096] (KTS) [Entered: 01/25/2022 10:43 AM]
January 25, 2022 Filing 47 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Hess Corp. [22-1096] (MHB) [Entered: 01/25/2022 10:39 AM]
January 25, 2022 Filing 46 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Murphy Oil Corporation. [22-1096] (MHB) [Entered: 01/25/2022 10:36 AM]
January 25, 2022 Filing 45 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Megan Berge on behalf of Appellant(s) Hess Corporation, Murphy Oil Company. [22-1096] (MHB) [Entered: 01/25/2022 10:31 AM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 44 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant ConocoPhillips. [22-1096] (DRB) [Entered: 01/24/2022 05:07 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 43 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant ConocoPhillips Co. [22-1096] (DRB) [Entered: 01/24/2022 05:06 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 42 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Diana E. Reiter on behalf of Appellant(s) BP plc and BP America Inc.. [22-1096] (DER) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:39 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 41 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John D. Lombardo on behalf of Appellant(s) BP plc and BP America Inc.. [22-1096] (JDL) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:34 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 40 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Phillips 66 Co. [22-1096] (SMB) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:29 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 39 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan W. Hughes on behalf of Appellant(s) BP plc and BP America Inc.. [22-1096] (JWH) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:28 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 38 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Phillips 66. [22-1096] (SMB) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:24 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 37 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew T. Heartney on behalf of Appellant(s) BP plc and BP America Inc.. [22-1096] (MTH) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:22 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 36 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Paul J. Fishman on behalf of Appellant(s) BP plc and BP America Inc.. [22-1096] (PJF) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:16 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 35 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joy C. Fuhr on behalf of Appellant(s) Devon Energy Corporation. [22-1096] (JCF) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:11 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 34 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Devon Energy Corp. [22-1096] (BDS) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:07 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 33 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant BP plc. [22-1096] (NGM) [Entered: 01/24/2022 03:57 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 32 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Brian D. Schmalzbach on behalf of Appellant(s) Devon Energy Corporation. [22-1096] (BDS) [Entered: 01/24/2022 03:54 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 31 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kathryn M. Barber on behalf of Appellant(s) American Petroleum Institute. [22-1096] (KMB) [Entered: 01/24/2022 03:49 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 30 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant BP America Inc. [22-1096] (NGM) [Entered: 01/24/2022 03:47 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 29 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nancy G. Milburn on behalf of Appellant(s) BP plc and BP America Inc.. [22-1096] (NGM) [Entered: 01/24/2022 03:36 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 28 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant American Petroleum Institute. [22-1096] (AGM) [Entered: 01/24/2022 03:22 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 27 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew G. McBride on behalf of Appellant(s) American Petroleum Institute. [22-1096] (AGM) [Entered: 01/24/2022 03:19 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 26 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kevin J. Mangan on behalf of Appellant(s) American Petroleum Institute. [22-1096] (KJM) [Entered: 01/24/2022 02:27 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 25 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Noel J. Francisco on behalf of Appellant(s) CNX Resources Corporation. [22-1096] (NJF) [Entered: 01/24/2022 01:40 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 24 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christian J. Singewald on behalf of Appellant(s) Devon Energy Corporation. [22-1096] (CJS) [Entered: 01/24/2022 01:15 PM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 23 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel J. Brown on behalf of Appellant(s) ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 and Phillips 66 Company. [22-1096] (DJB) [Entered: 01/24/2022 11:38 AM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 22 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant ExxonMobil Oil Corp. [22-1096] (KKS) [Entered: 01/24/2022 11:22 AM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 21 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Exxon Mobil Corp. [22-1096] (KKS) [Entered: 01/24/2022 11:20 AM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 20 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William T. Marks on behalf of Appellant(s) Exxon Mobil Corp and ExxonMobil Oil Corp. [22-1096] (WTM) [Entered: 01/24/2022 11:18 AM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 19 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel J. Toal on behalf of Appellant(s) Exxon Mobil Corp and ExxonMobil Oil Corp. [22-1096] (DJT) [Entered: 01/24/2022 11:15 AM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 18 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Theodore V. Wells, Jr. on behalf of Appellant(s) Exxon Mobil Corp and ExxonMobil Oil Corp. [22-1096] (TVW) [Entered: 01/24/2022 11:11 AM]
January 24, 2022 Filing 17 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kannon K. Shanmugam on behalf of Appellant(s) Exxon Mobil Corp and ExxonMobil Oil Corp. [22-1096] (KKS) [Entered: 01/24/2022 11:08 AM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 16 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Steven L. Caponi on behalf of Appellant(s) Royal Dutch Shell plc; Shell Oil Company. [22-1096] (SLC) [Entered: 01/21/2022 04:39 PM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 15 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Grace W. Knofczynski on behalf of Appellant(s) Royal Dutch Shell plc, Shell Oil Company. [22-1096] (GWK) [Entered: 01/21/2022 04:35 PM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 14 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel S. Severson on behalf of Appellant(s) Royal Dutch Shell plc, Shell Oil Company. [22-1096] (DS) [Entered: 01/21/2022 04:30 PM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 13 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Shell Oil Co. [22-1096] (DCF) [Entered: 01/21/2022 04:25 PM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 12 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Royal Dutch Shell PLC. [22-1096] (DCF) [Entered: 01/21/2022 04:23 PM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 11 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David C. Frederick on behalf of Appellant(s) Royal Dutch Shell plc, Shell Oil Company. [22-1096] (DCF) [Entered: 01/21/2022 04:20 PM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 10 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Margaret A. Tough on behalf of Appellant(s) Phillips 66 and Phillips 66 Company. [22-1096] (MT) [Entered: 01/21/2022 01:59 PM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 9 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Margaret A. Tough on behalf of Appellant(s) ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [22-1096] (MT) [Entered: 01/21/2022 01:58 PM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Steven Mark Bauer on behalf of Appellant(s) Phillips 66 and Phillips 66 Company. [22-1096] (SMB) [Entered: 01/21/2022 01:53 PM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 7 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Steven Mark Bauer on behalf of Appellant(s) ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [22-1096] (SMB) [Entered: 01/21/2022 01:50 PM]
January 20, 2022 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Victor M. Sher on behalf of Appellee(s) State of Delaware. [22-1096] (VMS) [Entered: 01/20/2022 06:54 PM]
January 20, 2022 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jameson R. Jones on behalf of Appellant(s) ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [22-1096] (JRJ) [Entered: 01/20/2022 04:37 PM]
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel R. Brody on behalf of Appellant(s) ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company. [22-1096] (DRB) [Entered: 01/20/2022 04:27 PM]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Clerk) Many of the defendants have appealed an order remanding this case back to state court. Because they filed a joint notice of appeal, the appellants must file a joint opening brief and reply brief. See 3d Cir. L.A.R. 3.2. This appeal may raise issues similar to those raised in City of Hoboken v. Chevron Corp. (3d Cir. No. 21-2728). If any party believes this new appeal should be stayed pending No. 21-2728, an appropriate motion should be filed promptly. (SLC) [Entered: 01/19/2022 11:23 AM]
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 01/19/2022 11:20 AM]
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants American Petroleum Institute, Apache Corp, BP America Inc, BP plc, CNX Resources Corp, Chevron Corp, Chevron USA Inc, Citgo Petroleum Corp, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Co, Consol Energy Inc, Devon Energy Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, ExxonMobil Oil Corp, Hess Corp, Marathon Oil Corp, Marathon Petroleum Co LP, Marathon Petroleum Corp, Murphy Oil Corp, Murphy USA, Occidental Petroleum Corp, Ovintiv Inc, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Co, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Co, Speedway LLC, Total SA, TotalEnergies Marketing USA Inc and XTO Energy Inc in District Court No. 1-20-cv-01429. (SLC) [Entered: 01/19/2022 11:17 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of Delaware v. BP America Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF DELAWARE, ex rel. Kathleen Jennings, Attorney General of the State of Delaware
Represented By: Ralph K. Durstein Esq. III
Represented By: Jameson A.L. Tweedie Esq.
Represented By: Christian D. Wright Esq.
Represented By: Stephanie D. Biehl Esq.
Represented By: Matthew K. Edling Esq.
Represented By: Quentin C. Karpilow Esq.
Represented By: Victor M. Sher Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BP AMERICA INC
Represented By: Catherine A. Gaul Esq.
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: John D. Lombardo Esq.
Represented By: Nancy G. Milburn Esq.
Represented By: Diana E. Reiter Esq.
Represented By: Paul J. Fishman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BP PLC
Represented By: Catherine A. Gaul Esq.
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: John D. Lombardo Esq.
Represented By: Nancy G. Milburn Esq.
Represented By: Diana E. Reiter Esq.
Represented By: Paul J. Fishman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHEVRON CORP
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Joshua D. Dick Esq.
Represented By: Thomas G. Hungar Esq.
Represented By: Andrea E. Neuman Esq.
Represented By: Russell S. Nolte Esq.
Represented By: William E. Thomson Esq. III
Represented By: David E. Wilks Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHEVRON USA INC
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Joshua D. Dick Esq.
Represented By: Thomas G. Hungar Esq.
Represented By: Andrea E. Neuman Esq.
Represented By: Russell S. Nolte Esq.
Represented By: William E. Thomson Esq. III
Represented By: David E. Wilks Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CONOCOPHILLIPS
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer Esq.
Represented By: Daniel R. Brody Esq.
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown Esq.
Represented By: Jameson R. Jones Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce Esq.
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly Esq.
Represented By: Margaret Tough Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CONOCOPHILLIPS CO
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer Esq.
Represented By: Daniel R. Brody Esq.
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown Esq.
Represented By: Jameson R. Jones Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce Esq.
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly Esq.
Represented By: Margaret Tough Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PHILLIPS 66
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer Esq.
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce Esq.
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly Esq.
Represented By: Margaret Tough Esq.
Represented By: Robert W. Whetzel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PHILLIPS 66 CO
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer Esq.
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce Esq.
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly Esq.
Represented By: Margaret Tough Esq.
Represented By: Robert W. Whetzel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EXXON MOBIL CORP
Represented By: Yahonnes Cleary Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin E. Grusauskas Esq.
Represented By: Daniel A. Mason Esq.
Represented By: Matthew D. Stachel Esq.
Represented By: Daniel J. Toal Esq.
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells Esq. Jr.
Represented By: William T. Marks Esq.
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP
Represented By: Yahonnes Cleary Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin E. Grusauskas Esq.
Represented By: Daniel A. Mason Esq.
Represented By: Matthew D. Stachel Esq.
Represented By: Daniel J. Toal Esq.
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells Esq. Jr.
Represented By: William T. Marks Esq.
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: XTO ENERGY INC
Represented By: Yahonnes Cleary Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin E. Grusauskas Esq.
Represented By: Daniel A. Mason Esq.
Represented By: Matthew D. Stachel Esq.
Represented By: Daniel J. Toal Esq.
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells Esq. Jr.
Represented By: William T. Marks Esq.
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HESS CORP
Represented By: Joseph J. Bellew Esq.
Represented By: Megan H. Berge Esq.
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARATHON OIL CORP
Represented By: Michael A. Barlow Esq.
Represented By: Catherine Y. Lui Esq.
Represented By: Robert P. Reznick Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARATHON PETROLEUM CORP
Represented By: Shannon S. Broome Esq.
Represented By: Stephanie A. Fox Esq.
Represented By: Antoinette D. Hubbard Esq.
Represented By: Ann M. Mortimore Esq.
Represented By: Shawn P. Regan Esq.
Represented By: Colleen D. Shields Esq.
Represented By: Patrick M. Brannigan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARATHON PETROLEUM CO LP
Represented By: Patrick M. Brannigan Esq.
Represented By: Shannon S. Broome Esq.
Represented By: Stephanie A. Fox Esq.
Represented By: Antoinette D. Hubbard Esq.
Represented By: Ann M. Mortimore Esq.
Represented By: Shawn P. Regan Esq.
Represented By: Colleen D. Shields Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SPEEDWAY LLC
Represented By: Patrick M. Brannigan Esq.
Represented By: Shannon S. Broome Esq.
Represented By: Stephanie A. Fox Esq.
Represented By: Antoinette D. Hubbard Esq.
Represented By: Ann M. Mortimore Esq.
Represented By: Shawn P. Regan Esq.
Represented By: Colleen D. Shields Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MURPHY OIL CORP
Represented By: Joseph J. Bellew Esq.
Represented By: Megan H. Berge Esq.
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MURPHY USA
Represented By: Patrick M. Brannigan Esq.
Represented By: Tristan L. Duncan Esq.
Represented By: William F. Northrip Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Rogers Esq.
Represented By: Colleen D. Shields Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi Esq.
Represented By: David C. Frederick Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Goeller Esq.
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski Esq.
Represented By: Daniel Severson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SHELL OIL CO
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi Esq.
Represented By: David C. Frederick Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Goeller Esq.
Represented By: Grace W. Knofczynski Esq.
Represented By: Daniel Severson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CITGO PETROLEUM CORP
Represented By: Alexandra M. Cumings Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Dunn Esq.
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer Esq.
Represented By: Pamela R. Hanebutt Esq.
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer Esq.
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TOTAL SA
Represented By: Blake K. Rohrbacher Esq.
Represented By: Robert W. Whetzel Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra Ewing Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORP
Represented By: Christine D. Haynes Esq.
Represented By: Vanessa Lavely Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer Esq.
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DEVON ENERGY CORP
Represented By: Joy C. Fuhr Esq.
Represented By: W. Cole Geddy Esq.
Represented By: Brian D. Schmalzbach Esq.
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: APACHE CORP
Represented By: Michael A. Barlow Esq.
Represented By: Patrick W. Mizell Esq.
Represented By: Brooke A. Noble Esq.
Represented By: Stephanie L. Noble Esq.
Represented By: Robert P. Reznick Esq.
Represented By: Marc R. Shapiro DPM
Represented By: Matthew R. Stammel Esq.
Represented By: James Stengel Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra Ewing Esq.
Represented By: Robert W. Whetzel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CNX RESOURCES CORP
Represented By: J. Benjamin Aguinaga Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Brown Esq.
Represented By: Noel J. Francisco Esq.
Represented By: David C. Kiernan Esq.
Represented By: David M. Morrell Esq.
Represented By: Tracy A. Roman Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen T. Sooy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CONSOL ENERGY INC
Represented By: Paul D. Brown Esq.
Represented By: Michael F. Healy Esq.
Represented By: Tracy A. Roman Esq.
Represented By: Kathleen T. Sooy Esq.
Represented By: Mackenzie M. Wrobel Esq.
Represented By: Honor R. Costello Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OVINTIV INC
Represented By: J. Benjamin Aguinaga Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Brown Esq.
Represented By: Michael L. Fox Esq.
Represented By: Noel J. Francisco Esq.
Represented By: David M. Morrell Esq.
Represented By: Michael F. Healy Esq.
Represented By: Mackenzie M. Wrobel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE
Represented By: Kristen H. Cramer Esq.
Represented By: Kevin J. Mangan Esq.
Represented By: Andrew G. McBride Esq.
Represented By: Nicholas T. Verna Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TOTALENERGIES MARKETING USA INC
Represented By: Robert W. Whetzel Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra Ewing Esq.
Represented By: Blake K. Rohrbacher Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?