Stansell et al v. Revolutionary Armed Forces of Colombia (FARC) et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan N. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Christopher T. Janis, Keith Stansell, Thomas Howes, Marc Gonsalves and Michael I. Janis
Defendant: Carlos Alberto Garcia, Juan Jose Martinez Vega, Efrain Mendez, Abelardo Caicedo Colorado, Hermilo Cabrera Diaz, Edilma Morales Loaiza, Ernesto Hurtado Penalosa, Luis Eduardo Oyola Diaz, Luis Eduardo Lopez Medez, Gerardo Antonio Aguilar Ramirez, Alvro Alfonso Serpa Diaz, Yarlei Banol-Ramos, Alexis Freddy Mosquera-Renteria, Maribel Gallego Rubio, Victor Julio Suarez Rojas, Camilo Rueda Gil, Noe Suarez Rojas, Heli Mejia Mendoza, Alonso Olarte Lombana, Jaime Cotrino Diaz, Bladimir Culma Sunz, Jorge Abel Ibarguen-Palacio, Milton De Jesus Toncel Redondo, Gildardo Garcia Cardona, Fernelli Rizo Carrascal, Vlaudin Rodrigo Vega, Victor Restrepo, Ana Leonor Torres, Juvenal Ovidio Ricardo Palmera Pineda, Miguel Angel Pascuas Santos, Jose Epinemio Molina Gonzalez, Gener Garcia Molina, Emiro Del Carmen Rope Suarez, Anayibe Rojas Valderrama, Norbei Camargo, Felix Antonio Munoz Lascarro, Omar Arturo Zabala Padilla, Guillermo Enrique Torres Cueter, Guillermo Leon Saenz, Rodrigo Granda, Edgar Lopez Gomez, Jose Benito Cabrera Cuevas, Juan Diego Giraldo, Luis Antonio Lozado, Omar Oyola Estupinan, Alexander Farfan Suarez, Luciano Marin, Jose Maria Corredor Ibague, Sixto Antonio Cabana Guillen, Miguel Santanilla Botache, Tomas Molina Caracas, Jose Antonio Celis, Walter Tapiero, Gustavo Gonzalez Sanchez, Elmer Caviedes, Edgar Salgado Aragon, Jorge Torres Victoria, Luz Mery Gutierrez Vergara, Jose Armando Cadena Cabrera, Ana Isabel Pena Arevalo, Ignacio Leal Garcia, Jorge Enrique Mendieta Rodriguez, Wilkin Fernando Lugo, Jose Fernando Romero Mejia, Wilson Burbano Ordonez, Erasmo Traslavina Benavides, Maria Remedios Garcia Albert, Rodrigo Londono Echeverry, Josue Cuesta Leon, Henry Castellanos Garzon, Nancy Conde Rubio, Erminso Cuevas Cabrera, Timoleon Jimenez, Arcesio, Reciclo, Calvo, Joaquin Gomez, Sonia, Lucas Gualdron, El Viejo, Gabriel Culma, Pastor Alape, Gentil Duarte, Mono Jojoy, Efren Arboleda, Alviro Rojas, Bronco, Ronald, Jorge Briceno Suarez, Karen Saieh, Rodrigo, Luis Eduardo Marin, Pacho Chino, Pedro Aldana, Johnny, Francisco Antonio Cadena Collazos, Ovidio Salinas Perez, Revolutionary Armed Forces of Colombia (FARC), Jurga Jurga, Danilo Garcia, Bank of America Corporation, Cesar, Carlos Antonio Lozada, Simon Trinidad, Oscar Montero, Laura Saieh, Maritza, El Boyaco, Irene, Cochornea, Jorge Davalos Torres, Orlay Jurado Palomino, Negro Acacio, Jairo Alfonse Lesmes Bulla, Domingo Bioho, Enrique Gafas, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc., Ivan Vargas, Bertulio, Guillermo, Flaco, Carlos Vlaudin, Commander Romel, John Hernandez, Grannobles, Jorge Humberto Cortes, Tuerto, Rambo, Kathya Saieh, Jose Lisandro Lascarro, Sandra Saieh, Martin Cuero, Efrain Pablo Rejo Freire, Soraya, Humberto, J.H., Chiguiro, Timochenko, Turbo, Miller Munar Munar, Juliana, Rafael Gutierrez, Granada Associates, Inc., Vladimir, German Briceno Suarez, Teofilo Florero, Doris Adriana, Jimmy Guerrero, Martin Sombra, Nubia Calderon De Trujillo, Cadete, Esponja, Pablo Catatumbo, Solis Almeida, Julian Conrado, Ricardo Gonzalez, Mery, Ismardo Lozada, El Primo, Sargento Pascuas, Ruben Zamora, Rigoberto Lozano, Alfonso Cano, Rafael Capillo, James Patapalo, Albiero Cordoba, Diana, Carolina Yanave Rojas, Ivan Marquez, El Morocho, Jaime Saieh, Negro Elecier, Marco Fanfan, Felipe Rincon, Victor Tirado, Camilo, Liliana Lopez Palacios, Herimides Buitrago, Fabian Ramirez, Romana, Dona Chava and Mincho
Petitioner: Leucadendra 325, LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave 64e LLC, 200g PSA Holdings LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave Unit 46b LLC,, Samark Lopez Bello, USA, EPBC Holdings, Ltd., Yakima Trading Corporation, 1425 Brickell Ave 63-F LLC and MFAA Holdings Ltd
Garnishee: Capital Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., BNP Paribas, Standard Chartered Bank, NAFH National Bank, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Ocean Bank, COMMERZBANK AG, NEW YORK BRANCH, Wachovia Bank, Falcon International Bank, Credit Suisse AG, Turnberry Bank, Bank of America, N.A., Banco Santander International, Interaudi Bank, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, UBS AG, JGB Bank, N.A. and HSBC Bank, USA
Not Classified By Court: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and The Bank of New York Mellon
Claimant: Brunello, Ltd., Plainview Florida II, Inc., Golfrate Holdings (Angola) LDA, Miriam Sutherlin, Kassim Tajideen, Bauza, Inc., Jacqueline Saieh, Moises Saieh, ALM Investment Florida, Inc., Armando Jaar, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Ricardo Jaar, 11420 Corp., Mercurio International S.A., Carlos Saieh, Karen Overseas, Inc., Abdala Saieh, Jamce Investments, Ltd., Noor Plantation Investments LLC, SAI Advisors Inc., Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera, Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, C.W. Salman Partners, Jacaria Florida, Inc., MLA Investments Inc., Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Confecciones Lord S.A., Carmen Siman, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc., Salman Coral Way Partners, Luis Sutherlin, Benedicto Romero Barrera and Amelia Saieh
Interested Party: Terrabank, N.A., Stanchart Securities International, Inc. and Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited
Intervenor: HS AD, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2009cv02308
Filed: November 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Manatee
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 1225 NOTIFICATION that transcript has been filed by SHARON A. MILLER re: #1220 Notice of Appeal. USCA number: 20-13660. (SAM)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1224 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT by SHARON A. MILLER re #1220 Notice of Appeal Estimated transcript filing date: SEPTEMBER 11, 2020. USCA number: 20-13660. (SAM)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1223 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by 1425 Brickell Ave 63-F LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave 64e LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave Unit 46b LLC,, 200g PSA Holdings LLC, EPBC Holdings, Ltd., Leucadendra 325, LLC, Samark Lopez Bello, MFAA Holdings Ltd, Yakima Trading Corporation re #1220 Notice of Appeal. USCA number: 20-13660. (Fels, Adam)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1222 ORDER: Movants' Motion to Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure #1205 is DENIED, as announced at the hearing on September 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/5/2020. (GLP)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1221 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #1220 Notice of Appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (DG)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1220 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 1215 Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement by 1425 Brickell Ave 63-F LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave 64e LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave Unit 46b LLC, 200g PSA Holdings LLC, EPBC Holdings, Ltd., Leucadendra 325, LLC, Samark Lopez Bello, MFAA Holdings Ltd, Yakima Trading Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113A-17354521. (Fels, Adam) Modified on 9/28/2020 (DG).
September 11, 2020 Filing 1219 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Sharon A. Miller. (SAM)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1218 TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on SEPTEMBER 1, 2020 before Judge CHARLENE EDWARDS HONEYWELL. Court Reporter/Transcriber SHARON A. MILLER,Telephone number 813-301-5041. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 10/2/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2020. (SAM)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1217 STIPULATION re #1216 Judgment Joint Stipulation of Garnishee Ocean Bank's Full Compliance and Turnover of SDNTK Account Proceeds by Ocean Bank. (Mora, Martha)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1216 FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT. See Judgment for complete details. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/1/2020. (BGS)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1215 ORAL ORDER denying #1205 Motion to Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/1/2020. (BGS)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1214 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell: MOTION HEARING held on 9/1/2020 re #1205 MOTION to Correct #233 Default judgment Under Rule 60(a) filed by 1425 Brickell Ave 64e LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave Unit 46b LLC,, 1425 Brickell Ave 63-F LLC, 200g PSA Holdings LLC, Samark Lopez Bello, MFAA Holdings Ltd, EPBC Holdings, Ltd., Leucadendra 325, LLC, Yakima Trading Corporation. Court Reporter: Sharon A. Miller (BGS)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1213 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re #1205 MOTION to Correct #233 Default judgment Under Rule 60(a). Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2020 at 11:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. The hearing scheduled for SEPTEMBER 1, 2020 will be conducted via ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE. The Clerk will be sending everyone an invitation to the meeting via email. If you have any questions, please contact courtroom deputy, Bettye Samuel, at Bettye_Samuel@flmd.uscourts.gov. Although the hearing is taking place by video, all parties should dress appropriately for this Court proceeding. Furthermore, the parties are hereby reminded that under Local Rule 4.11(b) the taking of photographs, the operation of recording or transmission devices, and the broadcasting or televising of proceedings in any courtroom or hearing room of this Court, or the environs thereof, either while the Court is in session or at recesses between sessions when Court officials, lawyers, jurors, witnesses or other persons connected with judicial proceedings of any kind are present, are prohibited.(BGS)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1212 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1205 MOTION to Correct #233 Default judgment Under Rule 60(a) filed by 1425 Brickell Ave 63-F LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave 64e LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave Unit 46b LLC,, 200g PSA Holdings LLC, EPBC Holdings, Ltd., Leucadendra 325, LLC, Samark Lopez Bello, MFAA Holdings Ltd, Yakima Trading Corporation. (Fels, Adam)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1211 ENDORSED ORDER granting #1209 Renewed Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. The movants are granted leave to file a reply, which shall not exceed ten (10) pages, on or before August 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/11/2020. (GLP)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1210 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1209 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply Brief filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1209 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply Brief by 1425 Brickell Ave 63-F LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave 64e LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave Unit 46b LLC,, 200g PSA Holdings LLC, EPBC Holdings, Ltd., Leucadendra 325, LLC, Samark Lopez Bello, MFAA Holdings Ltd, Yakima Trading Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fels, Adam)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1208 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(a), (g) #1207 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. The motion lacks a memorandum of legal authority in support of its request and a Local Rule 3.01(g) certification. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/7/2020. (GLP)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1207 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply Brief to DE 1205 (Rule 60(a) Motion) by 1425 Brickell Ave 63-F LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave 64e LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave Unit 46b LLC,, 200g PSA Holdings LLC, EPBC Holdings, Ltd., Leucadendra 325, LLC, Samark Lopez Bello, MFAA Holdings Ltd, Yakima Trading Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fels, Adam)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1206 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1205 MOTION to Correct #233 Default judgment Under Rule 60(a) filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OFAC Chart, #2 Exhibit OFAC Kingpin Designation Fact Findings)(Korvick, Tony)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1205 MOTION to Correct #233 Default judgment Under Rule 60(a) by Samark Lopez Bello, Yakima Trading Corporation, EPBC Holdings, Ltd., 1425 Brickell Ave 63-F LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave Unit 46b LLC, 1425 Brickell Ave 64e LLC, 200g PSA Holdings LLC, Leucadendra 325, LLC, MFAA Holdings Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Fels, Adam) Modified on 7/24/2020 (DG).
August 5, 2019 Sealed Document: S-1202 & S-1203 (CTR)
July 8, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable/Inmate not approved to Correspond or Expired/Unable to Forward from P.O. Box 5000 Yazoo City, MS 39194 re: #1200 Order on motion for judgmentOrder on Report and Recommendations. Mail not resent to Jose Antonio Celis. (CTR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1201 STIPULATION re #1200 Order on motion for judgmentOrder on Report and Recommendations Joint Stipulation Pertaining to Garnishee Ocean Bank's Fees and Expenses by Ocean Bank. (Mora, Martha)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1200 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Objection is SUSTAINED. The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge #1194 is modified to reflect that Plaintiffs can execute their judgment on blocked assets under the Kingpin Act without an OFAC license. No OFAC license is required under these circumstances. The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge #1194 is otherwise adopted, confirmed, and approved and is made a part of this Order for all purposes, including appellate review. Plaintiff's Motion for Turnover Judgment under the Terrorism Act #1185 is GRANTED. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/20/2019. (JJH)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1199 MANDATE of USCA: DISMISSED as to #1145 Notice of appeal filed by 11420 Corp., SAI Advisors Inc., Noor Plantation Investments LLC Issued as Mandate: 6/10/19. USCA number: 18-13696-GG. (JNB)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1198 OPINION/ORDER of USCA: DISMISSED as to #1145 Notice of appeal filed by 11420 Corp., SAI Advisors Inc., Noor Plantation Investments LLC. EOD: 5/10/19; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 18-13696-G. (JNB)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1197 NOTICE by USA Statement of Interest (Konkoly, Antonia)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1196 NOTICE by USA of Potential Participation (Konkoly, Antonia)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1195 OBJECTION re #1194 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1185 MOTION for TRIA Turnover judgment filed by Keith Stansell, Greer C. Janis, Marc Gonsalves, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis. PLAINTIFFS' LIMITED OBJECTION TO REPORT & RECOMMENDATIONS [DE 1194] REGARDING THE NEED FOR AN OFAC LICENSE. (Korvick, Tony)
March 25, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable/Forwarding Time from P.O. Box 5000 Yazoo City, MS 39194 re: #1193 Order on Motion for Protective Order. Mail not resent to Jose Antonio Celis. (CTR)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1194 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on #1185 motion for turnover judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/25/2019. (DMP)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1193 PROTECTIVE ORDER and ORDER granting #1192 motion for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/15/2019. (DMP)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1192 Unopposed MOTION for protective order by USA. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Prop. Order)(Glass, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
February 21, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable/Expired/Inmate not Approved from P.O. 5000, Yazoo City, MS 39194 re: #1189 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment. Mail not resent to Jose Antonio Celis. (CTR)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1191 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #1178 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment FOR ISSUANCE OF TRIA WRITS OF EXECUTION ON BLOCKED KINGPIN ACT ASSETS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW. filed by Keith Stansell, Greer C. Janis, Marc Gonsalves, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, #1179 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment FOR ISSUANCE OF TRIA WRITS OF EXECUTION ON BLOCKED KINGPIN ACT ASSETS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW. filed by Greer C. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis (Korvick, Tony)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1190 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re #1189 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 ORDER taking under advisement #1178 and #1179 motions for writs of execution and writs of garnishment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/7/2019. (DMP)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1188 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #1178 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment FOR ISSUANCE OF TRIA WRITS OF EXECUTION ON BLOCKED KINGPIN ACT ASSETS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW. and Request for Judicial Notice and for Leave to Submit Proposed Order by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jan. 23, 2019 SDNY Order DE 19)(Korvick, Tony)
January 25, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable (FCI Yazoo City Low P.O. Box 5000 Yazoo City, MS 39194 unable to forward) re: #1186 Order referring motion for report and recommendation. Mail not resent to Jose Antonio Celis. (JCG)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1187 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell Withdrawing MOTION TO SEAL filed on December 21, 2018 and SUPPLEMTAL MOTION TO SEAL filed January 7, 2019 (Korvick, Tony)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1204 ORDER of Referral to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/8/2019. (CTR)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 ORDER referring motion for report and recommendation: #1185 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of TRIA Turnover Judgment on Garnishee Ocean Bank's Answer and Memorandum of Law filed by Keith Stansell, Greer C. Janis, Marc Gonsalves, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/7/2019. (BGS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
January 3, 2019 Filing 1185 MOTION for TRIA Turnover judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Newton)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1184 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell OF WITHDRAWAL AND DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN WRITS OF EXECUTION/GARNISHMENT [DE 301, 302, 339, 373, 374] (Korvick, Tony)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1183 NOTICE of compliance Fla.Stat.77.055.Ocean.Bank.Notice.Answer by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Porter, Newton)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1182 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Garnishee Ocean Bank's Answer to Writ of Execution/Garnishment by Ocean Bank. (Mora, Martha)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1181 NOTICE of compliance Fla.Stat.77.041.Writ.DE.369 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Porter, Newton)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1180 NOTICE of compliance Fla.Stat.77.041 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Porter, Newton)
December 3, 2018 Mail returned as Undeliverable/Not Deliverable from P.O. Box 5000 Yazoo City, MS 39194 re: #1166 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment. Mail not resent to Jose Antonio Celis. (CTR)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1179 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment FOR ISSUANCE OF TRIA WRITS OF EXECUTION ON BLOCKED KINGPIN ACT ASSETS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit proposed writ Eastern National Bank, #4 Exhibit proposed writ US Century Bank - Banco Continental, #5 Exhibit proposed writ US Century Bank - Invesriones Continental, #6 Exhibit proposed writ US Century Bank - Jaime Rosenthal, #7 Exhibit proposed writ US Century Bank - Yani Rosenthal)(Korvick, Tony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
November 28, 2018 Filing 1178 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment FOR ISSUANCE OF TRIA WRITS OF EXECUTION ON BLOCKED KINGPIN ACT ASSETS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit proposed writ of garnishment to Raymond James, #15 Exhibit proposed writ execution condo 63-F, #16 Exhibit proposed writ execution condo 46-B, #17 Exhibit proposed writ of execution condo 64-E, #18 Exhibit proposed writ of executionon Gulfstream jet, #19 Exhibit proposed writ of execution Waku Trinity, #20 Exhibit proposed writ of execution Waku Benetti, #21 Exhibit proposed writ of execution autos)(Korvick, Tony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(a) #1169 motion for writ of execution and #1175 motion for writ of garnishment. The Clerk is directed to strike the plaintiffs' memoranda at #1170 and #1176 from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/28/2018. (DMP)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1176 ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 1177***MEMORANDUM in support re #1175 Motion for Writ of Garnishment filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony) Modified on 11/28/2018 (CTR).
November 27, 2018 Filing 1175 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment . by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Oct. 2015 OFAC Chart: Rosenthal MLO, #2 Exhibit 10/7/15 OFAC: "Treasury Sanctions Rosenthal Money Laundering Organization", #3 Exhibit proposed Writ of Garnishment to Eastern National Bank, #4 Exhibit proposed Writ of Garnishment to US Century Bank - Banco Continental, #5 Exhibit proposed Writ of ZGarnishment to US Century Bank - Inversiones Panama, #6 Exhibit proposed Writ of Garnishment to US Century Bank with Notice to Individuals for Jaime Rosenthal, #7 Exhibit proposed Writ of Garnishment to US Century Bank with Notice to Individuals for Yani Rosenthal)(Korvick, Tony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
November 27, 2018 Filing 1174 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF DOUG FARAH (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Doug Farah with CV)(Korvick, Tony)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1173 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell OF FILING APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF TRIA WRIT OF EXECUTION/GARNISHMENT ON ROSENTHAL MONEY LAUNDERING ORGANIZATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Feb. 2013 OFAC Chart: Linares Castillo DTO "Collaborates with FARC on international narcotics trafficking", #2 Exhibit 4/30/13 SDFL USAO: International Narcotics Trafficker Extradited to Face Drug Trafficking and Narco-Terrorism Charges, #3 Exhibit 2013 Superseding Indictment SDNY Case No. 13-cr-413, U.S.A. v. Jaime Rosenthal Oliva et al., #4 Exhibit 9/19/13 OFAC: Treasury Targets "Los Cachiros" Drug Trafficking Organization in Honduras, #5 Exhibit Sept. 2013 OFAC Chart: Los Cachiros DTO, #6 Exhibit 10/7/15 SDNY USAO: Manhattan U.S. Attorney Announces Charges Against Four Prominent Honduran Businessmen For Laundering The Proceeds Of Narcotics And Bribery Offenses Through Accounts Located In The United States, #7 Exhibit 10/7/15 OFAC: "Treasury Sanctions Rosenthal Money Laundering Organization", #8 Exhibit Oct. 2015 OFAC Chart: Rosenthal MLO, #9 Exhibit 10/13/15 El Universal: "Honduras closes bank linked to the Sinaloa cartel", #10 Exhibit 3/6/17 Testimony of Cachiros leader Devis Leonel Rivera Maradiaga in US v. Fabio Porfiro Lobo (former President of Honduras), SDNY Case No. 15-cr-0174, DE 167, #11 Exhibit 8/31/17 Insight Crime: "Former Honduras Investment Minister Admits to Laundering Drug Money", #12 Exhibit 10/1/17 Insight Crime: Cachiros, #13 Exhibit 12/15/17 Sentencing Hearing Transcript U.S.A. v. Yani Benjamin Rosenthal Hidalgo SDNY Case No. 13-cr-413, DE 266, #14 Exhibit 1/19/18 Sentencing Hearing Transcript U.S.A. v. Yankel Rosnthal Coelo SDNY Case No. 13-cr-413, DE 266, #15 Exhibit 1/26/18 Sentencing Hearing Transcript for Rosenthal family lawyer in US v. Andres Acosta Garcia, SDNY Case No. 13-cr-413, DE 302, pp 24-25, #16 Exhibit 1/26/18 Reuters: "Honduran lawyer gets 14 months in U.S. money laundering case", #17 Exhibit 8/27/18 Insight Crime: "Honduras and Venezuela: Coup and Cocaine Air Bridge", #18 Exhibit 9/28/18 DEA Press Release: "Former Honduran National Police Chief sentenced to 14 years in prison for conspiring to import cocaine into the United States and to possess firearms.")(Korvick, Tony)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1172 NOTICE of compliance and Certificate of Service under Fla. Stat. 77.041(2) by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1171 US Marshal 285 form for Writ of Execution/Garnishment DE 1167. (Korvick, Tony)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1170 ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 1177***MEMORANDUM in support re #1169 Motion for Writ filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony) Modified on 11/28/2018 (CTR).
November 15, 2018 Filing 1169 MOTION for Writ Execution Under TRIA by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OFAC Chart, #2 Exhibit OFAC Press Release, #3 Exhibit FL Sec State report, #4 Exhibit OFAC Blocking Notice to Clerk, #5 Exhibit FL Sec State report, #6 Exhibit FL Sec State report, #7 Exhibit OFAC Blocking Notice to Clerk, #8 Exhibit OFAC Blocking Notice to County Aviation Authority, #9 Exhibit USA Response, #10 Exhibit photo, #11 Exhibit photo, #12 Exhibit ownership admission, #13 Exhibit OFAC Blocking Notice to FL DHSMV, #14 Exhibit proposed Writ, #15 Exhibit proposed Writ, #16 Exhibit proposed Writ, #17 Exhibit proposed Writ, #18 Exhibit proposed Writ, #19 Exhibit proposed Writ, #20 Exhibit proposed Writ, #21 Exhibit proposed Writ)(Korvick, Tony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
November 15, 2018 Filing 1168 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell of Filing Expert Witness Affidavit of Luis Miguel Cote (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Expert Luis Miguel Cote)(Korvick, Tony)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1167 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Ocean Bank in the amount of $301,831,178.28. (CTR)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1166 ORDER granting #1161 motion for writ of garnishment and to lift stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/13/2018. (DMP)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1165 US Marshal 285 form for Confirmation of October 26, 2018 Completed US Marshal's Execution Sales and USM Auction Records. (Porter, Newton)
October 30, 2018 Mail returned as Undeliverable/Addressee Unknown from P.O. Box 5000 Yazoo City, MS 39194 re: 1158 Case Assigned/Reassigned. Mail not resent to Jose Antonio Celis. (CTR)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1164 STATUS report Second Status Report on Real Property Executions-October 26, 2018 US Marshal sales by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9-25-18 OFAC Press Release)(Korvick, Tony)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1163 NOTICE of compliance Fla. Stat 56.21 Broward Review Affidavit of Publication Four Consecutive Weeks by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Broward Daily Business Review Affidavit Publication 4 Consecutive Weeks Oct. 26, 2018 Sales Date)(Porter, Newton)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1162 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:09-cv-2308-T-36AAS. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #1161 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment to Ocean Bank. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. (JNB)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1161 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment to Ocean Bank. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OFAC Chart Zevallos Aero Continente, #2 Exhibit Anti-Terrorism Clarification Act of 2018 PL 115-253 Amending 18 USC 2333 Enacted Oct. 3, 2018, #3 Exhibit June 1, 2004 OFAC Kingpin designation Zevallos et al., #4 Exhibit Nov. 10, 2004 OFAC Kingpin designation Aero Continente, #5 Exhibit OFAC Factual Findings Zevallos Aero Continente, #6 Exhibit Fla. Div. Corp. Aero Continente, S.A., #7 Exhibit OFAC SDN List Kingpins Zevallos Organization & Aero Continente, #8 Exhibit TRIA Writ of Garnishment Ocean Bank SDNTK Aero Continente)(Porter, Newton) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge M. A. Pizzo.
October 5, 2018 Filing 1160 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell of Filing Expert Witness Affidavit of Terry Parham (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Expert Witness Affidavit of Terry Parham)(Porter, Newton)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1159 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell of Change in the Law Allowing ATA Victims to Execute on assets blocked under the Foreign Narcotics Kingpin Designation Act (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Anti-Terrorism Clarification Act of 2018 PL 115-253 Amending 18 USC 2333 Enacted Oct. 3, 2018)(Porter, Newton)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1158 Case Reassigned to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. New case number: 8:09-cv-2308-T-36MAP. Judge Richard A. Lazzara no longer assigned to the case. (KE)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1157 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #1145 Notice of appeal. The following documents are being forwarded in paper format for the record on appeal by the USCA in addition to the electronic record. Volume of pleadings: 1 (SEALED). USCA number: 18-13696-GG (BSN)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1156 NOTICE of compliance with Fla. Stat 56.21 2d Publication Sales Date Oct. 26, 2018 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USM Executed Notice Sales, Sales Date Oct.26.2018, #2 Exhibit USM Sep. 24, 2018 Notice Certified Mailing & Copies ofEnvelopes)(Porter, Newton)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 ORDER of USCA: Motion to stay pending appeal filed by Appellants SAI Advisors Inc., Noor Plantation Investments LLC and 11420 Corp. is DENIED as to #1145 Notice of appeal filed by 11420 Corp., SAI Advisors Inc., Noor Plantation Investments LLC. EOD: 9/20/18; USCA number: 18-13696-G. (KE)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1154 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by 11420 Corp., Noor Plantation Investments LLC, SAI Advisors Inc. re #1145 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 18-13696-G. (Scherker, Elliot)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 ORDER of USCA:: Motion to stay pending appeal filed by Appellants SAI Advisors Inc., Noor Plantation Investments LLC and 11420 Corp. is GRANTED #1145 Notice of appeal filed by 11420 Corp., SAI Advisors Inc., Noor Plantation Investments LLC. EOD: 9/6/18; USCA number: 18-13696-G. (JNB)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1152 NOTICE by 11420 Corp., Noor Plantation Investments LLC, SAI Advisors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting Temporary Stay)(Scherker, Elliot)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1151 NOTICE of Appearance by Brigid F. Cech Samole on behalf of 11420 Corp., Noor Plantation Investments LLC, SAI Advisors Inc. (Cech Samole, Brigid)
September 6, 2018 USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number TPA052888 re #1145 Notice of appeal filed by 11420 Corp., SAI Advisors Inc., Noor Plantation Investments LLC (EA)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 ORDER denying #1147 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/5/2018. (CCB)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1149 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1147 MOTION to stay re #1144 Order on motion to stayOrder on Motion to Vacate Expedited Response in Opposition to Second Motion to Stay filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file an expedited response to #1147 Motion to stay #1144 Order by 5:00 p.m. TODAY, 9/4/2018. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/4/2018. (CCB)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1147 MOTION to stay re #1144 Order on motion to stayOrder on Motion to Vacate by 11420 Corp., Noor Plantation Investments LLC, SAI Advisors Inc.. (Scherker, Elliot)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1146 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #1145 Notice of appeal. (KMM)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1145 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1144 Order on motion to stayOrder on Motion to Vacate by 11420 Corp., Noor Plantation Investments LLC, SAI Advisors Inc.. Filing fee not paid. (Scherker, Elliot)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 ORDER denying #1139 Motion to Stay; denying #1139 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/31/2018. (CCB)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 ENDORSED ORDER denying #1142 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/31/2018. (CCB)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1142 MOTION for leave to file Reply and Proposed Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion to Vacate or Stay (DE:1141) by 11420 Corp., Noor Plantation Investments LLC, SAI Advisors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit / Declaration of Kara Bombach)(Scherker, Elliot)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1141 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1139 MOTION to stay re #1129 Notice (Other), #1119 Order on Motion for Writ, #1120 Writ Issued, #1125 Writ Issued, 1124 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #1122 Writ Issued, #1121 Writ Issued MOTION to Vacate #1129 Notice (Other), #1119 Order on Motion for Writ, #1120 Writ Issued, #1125 Writ Issued, 1124 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #1122 Writ Issued, #1121 Writ Issued Pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 60(B) filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file an expedited response to #1139 Motion to stay and Motion to Vacate Pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 60(B) no later than NOON tomorrow 8/31/2018. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/30/2018. (CCB)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1139 MOTION to stay re #1129 Notice (Other), #1119 Order on Motion for Writ, #1120 Writ Issued, #1125 Writ Issued, 1124 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #1122 Writ Issued, #1121 Writ Issued , MOTION to Vacate #1129 Notice (Other), #1119 Order on Motion for Writ, #1120 Writ Issued, #1125 Writ Issued, 1124 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #1122 Writ Issued, #1121 Writ Issued Pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 60(B) by 11420 Corp., Noor Plantation Investments LLC, SAI Advisors Inc.. (Scherker, Elliot)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1138 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot H. Scherker on behalf of 11420 Corp., Noor Plantation Investments LLC, SAI Advisors Inc. (Scherker, Elliot)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1137 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Allan Hirsch on behalf of SAI Advisors Inc., Noor Plantation Investments LLC, 11420 Corp. (Hirsch, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1136 STATUS report on Real Property Executions by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SAI Advisors, Inc. is an ACTIVE FL corp, #2 Exhibit Noor Plantation Investments LLC is an ACTIVE FL LLC, #3 Exhibit 11420 Corp. is an ACTIVE FL corp, #4 Exhibit SAI - registered agent resigned, #5 Exhibit Noor registered agent resigned, #6 Exhibit 11420 Corp registered agent resigned, #7 Exhibit DC Bar registration address for David Vidal-Cordero, Esq., #8 Exhibit SAI Annual Reports 2013-2017, #9 Exhibit Noor Annual Reports 2013-2017, #10 Exhibit 11420 Corp Annual Reports 2013-2017, #11 Exhibit Broward County 2018-2017 property tax refunds to Vidal-Cordero, #12 Exhibit USPS 8/2/18 delivery receipt USMS certified mailing to Vidal-Cordero)(Korvick, Tony)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1135 PROOF OF PUBLICATION by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell Notice of Compliance Fla.Stat.56.21 Broward Review Affidavit of Publication Four Consecutive Weeks; 8/3/18, 8/10/18, 8/17/18, 8/24/18 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Broward Daily Business Review Affidavit Publication 4 Consecutive Weeks)(Porter, Newton) Modified on 8/30/2018 (BSN).
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #1133 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/24/2018. (CCB)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1133 Unopposed MOTION for protective order by USA. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Prop. Order)(Glass, David)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1132 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Glass on behalf of USA (Glass, David)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1131 NOTICE of compliance Fla. Stat. 56.21 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S.Marshal Notice Certified Mailing)(Porter, Newton)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1130 NOTICE of compliance Fla. Stat. 56.27 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pursuant to Fla. Stat.56.27)(Porter, Newton)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1129 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell of Filing Notice of Sales (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S.Marshal Executed Notice of Sales)(Porter, Newton)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1128 US Marshal 285 form for 11420 Corp. Writ DE 1125. (Porter, Newton)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1127 US Marshal 285 form for SAI Advisors, Inc. Writ DE 1122. (Porter, Newton)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1126 US Marshal 285 form for Noor Plantation Investments LLC Writ DE1121. (Porter, Newton)
July 5, 2018 Filing 1125 WRIT of Execution issued (Amended re #1120) (BSN)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 ENDORSED ORDER granting #1123 Motion to Amend/Correct Writ of Execution. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/3/2018. (CCB)
July 3, 2018 Filing 1123 MOTION to Amend/Correct NOTICE OF SCRIVENER'S ERROR AND MOTION TO AMEND/CORRECT WRIT DE 1120 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit substitute Writ for DE 1120)(Korvick, Tony)
June 29, 2018 Filing 1122 WRIT of Execution issued (BSN)
June 29, 2018 Filing 1121 WRIT of Execution issued (BSN)
June 29, 2018 Filing 1120 WRIT of Execution issued. (BSN)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 ORDER ATTACHED directing TRIA Executions on Real Property and granting #1117 Motion for Writ. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/28/2018. (CCB)
June 18, 2018 Filing 1118 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #1116 Notice (Other) Filing Updated Curriculum Vitae Douglas Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Updated CV Doug Farah)(Porter, Newton)
June 10, 2018 Filing 1117 MOTION for Writ TRIA Execution on Florida Real Property by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8.3/8/15 [IEEPA] Executive Order 13692 "Blocking Property and Suspending Entry of Certain Persons Contributing to the Situation in Venezuela, #2 Exhibit 41.5/18/18 Treasury OFAC Press Release: "Treasury Targets Influential Former Venezuelan Official and His Corruption Network", #3 Exhibit Deed to 11420 Corp, #4 Exhibit Deed to Noor Plantation Investments LLC, #5 Exhibit Deed to SAI Advisors, Inc., #6 Exhibit FL Sec State corp records 11420 Corp, #7 Exhibit FL Sec State corp records for Noor Plantation Investments LLC, #8 Exhibit FL Sec State corp records for SAI Advisors Inc., #9 Exhibit 42.5/18/18 Treasury OFAC SDN List Update - Venezuela Designations, #10 Exhibit 5-18-18 OFAC Blocking Notice to Broward County Recorder, #11 Exhibit Writ of Execution 11420 Corp, #12 Exhibit Writ of Execution Noor Plantation Investments LLC, #13 Exhibit Writ of Execution SAI Advisors, Inc.)(Korvick, Tony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
June 10, 2018 Filing 1116 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell of Filing Affidavit of Douglas Farah (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Douglas Farah)(Korvick, Tony)
June 10, 2018 Filing 1115 APPENDIX PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF POST-JUDGMENT EXECUTION AGAINST AGENCIES AND INSTRUMENTALITIES OF THE FARC by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.9/12/08 Treasury OFAC Press Release: "Treasury Targets Venezuelan Government Officials Supporting the FARC", #2 Exhibit 2.9/8/11 Treasury OFAC Press Release: "Treasury Designated Four Venezuelan Officials for Providing Arms and Security to the FARC", #3 Exhibit 3.5/29/12 Reuters: "Fugitive Venezuela judge helps elite U.S. anti-drugs unit", #4 Exhibit 4.11/6/12: Testimony of Ambassador Roger F. Noriega Before the United States House Of Representatives Committee On Homeland Security, "A Line in the Sand: Assessing Dangerous Threats to Our Nation's Borders", #5 Exhibit 5.8/21/13 Treasury OFAC Press Release: "Treasury Targets Venezuelan Narcotics Trafficker - Action Designates Former Venezuelan Military Official, Previously Indicted", #6 Exhibit 6.1/21/15 Indictment (unsealed) USA v Nestor Luis Reverol Torres in EDNY Case No. 15-cr-00020 (former Director VZ National Anti-drug agency), #7 Exhibit 7.1/27/15 Epoch Times: "Venezuela's Assembly President is Head of Drug Cartel, Claims Ex-Security Chief", #8 Exhibit 8.3/8/15 [IEEPA] Executive Order 13692 "Blocking Property and Suspending Entry of Certain Persons Contributing to the Situation in Venezuela, #9 Exhibit 9.4/24/15 Indictment (unsealed) USA v. Pedro Luis Martin Olivares, SDFL Case No. 15-cr-20299, #10 Exhibit 10.8/11/15 American Enterprise Institute: "Venezuela: Rise of a narcostate", #11 Exhibit 11.12/15/15 New York Times: "Venezuelan Official Is Said to Be Charged in Drug Case in U.S. Court", #12 Exhibit 12.12/16/15 American Enterprise Institute: "Fresh evidence of the Venezuelan narcostate", #13 Exhibit 13.Jan/Feb 2016 Military Review, Prof. Leopoldo E. Colmenares G.: "Criminal Networks in Venezuela, Their Impact on Hemispheric Security", #14 Exhibit 14.2/18/16 Breitbart News: "Colombian Drug Lord: Venezuela's Former #2 Sold Cocaine to Islamic State", #15 Exhibit 15.8/1/16 DOJ Press Release: "Former Top Leaders Of Venezuela's Anti-Narcotics Agency Indicted For Trafficking Drugs To The United States", #16 Exhibit 16.11/3/16 Sun Herald: "U.S. judge delivers new blow to Venezuelan 'first nephews' on eve of trial", #17 Exhibit 17.11/9/16 Insight Crime: "Arrest of Third Suspect May be Gamechanger in Venezuela 'Narco Newphews' Case", #18 Exhibit 18.12/16/16 Insight Crime: "FARC Expels 5 Commanders, Revealing Extent of Rebel Fragmentation", #19 Exhibit 19.1/4/17 Insight Crime: "GameChangers 2016: Venezuela's Cartel of the Suns Revealed", #20 Exhibit 20.2/13/17 Treasury OFAC Press Release: "Treasury Sanctions Prominent Venezuelan Drug Trafficker Tareck El Aissami and his Primary Front Man Samark Lopez Bello", #21 Exhibit 21.2/13/17 OFAC Chart of El Aissami and Lopez Bello network, #22 Exhibit 22.June 2017 American Enterprise Institute: "Kingpins and Corruption, Targeting Transnational Organized Crime In The Americas", #23 Exhibit 23.8/13/17 Miami Herald: "Powerful Venezuelan lawmaker may have issued death order against Rubio", #24 Exhibit 24.8/16/17 Opinion & Order in Cabello-Rondon v Dow Jones & Co., SDNY Case No. 1:16-cv-03346-KBF dismissing defamation action arising from 5/18/15 WSJ article and finding that Cabello "failed to adequately plead material falsity", #25 Exhibit 25.9/14/17 Insight Crime: "The FARC's Riches: Millions Apparently Lost to Dissidents", #26 Exhibit 26.9/20/17 Treasury FINCEN "Advisory on Widespread Public Corruption in Venezuela", #27 Exhibit 27.12/14/17 DOJ Press Release: "Nephews of Venezuela First Lady Each Sentenced to 18 Years in Prison for Conspiring to Import Cocaine into the United States", #28 Exhibit 28.1/2/18 PanAmPost: "FARC Dissidents Continue Extortion and Drug Trafficking into 2018", #29 Exhibit 29.1/16/18 Insight Crime: "GameChangers 2017: Is Colombia's FARC Really Gone?", #30 Exhibit 30.3/20/18 Reuters: "Colombia FARC rebel dissidents number 1,200, military says", #31 Exhibit 31.4/10/18 NPR: "Former FARC Leader Arrested In Colombia On U.S. Drug Warrant", #32 Exhibit 32.4/22/18 LatAmPost: "FARC has not died: This is how its dissidents operate", #33 Exhibit 33.4/24/18 PanAmPost: "Testimony of Colombian Marlon Marin, nephew of "Ivan Marquez", head of the Colombian FARC guerilla, reveals once again that Chavismo's second most powerful man is "up to his neck" in the drug trade through the "Cartel de los Suns", #34 Exhibit 34.4/25/18 Summary Order from 2nd Circuit Court of Appeals in Cabello-Rondon v. Dow Jones Case 17-2895 affirming dismissal of defamation lawsuit vs Wall Street Journal, #35 Exhibit 35.4/24/18 New York Law Journal: "Second Circuit Affirms Dismissal of Libel Suit by Top Venezuelan Politician Over WSJ Report", #36 Exhibit 36.May 2018 Insight Crime:" "Venezuela-A Mafia State? 2. Drug Trafficking within the Venezuelan Regime: The Cartel of the Suns", #37 Exhibit 37.5/7/18 Treasury OFAC Press Release: "Treasury Sanctions Drug Trafficking and Money Laundering Network Led By Former Senior Venezuelan Intelligence Official", #38 Exhibit 38.5/7/18 OFAC Chart on Pedro Luis Martin Olivares network, #39 Exhibit 39.5/17/18 Insight Crime: "Drug Trafficking Within the Venezuelan Regime: The 'Cartel of the Suns'", #40 Exhibit 40.5/17/18 Business Standard: "Eight FARC dissidents killed in Colombia border clash", #41 Exhibit 41.5/18/18 Treasury OFAC Press Release: "Treasury Targets Influential Former Venezuelan Official and His Corruption Network", #42 Exhibit 42.5/18/18 Treasury OFAC SDN List Update - Venezuela Designations, #43 Exhibit 43.5/23/18 Insight Crime: "Colombia Dismantles Underground Drug Lab Linked to Ex-FARC Mafia", #44 Exhibit 44.6/2/18 Daily Beast: "How Cuba Helped Venezuela Become a Mafia State")(Korvick, Tony)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 ORDER granting #1113 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/1/2017. (SKH)
September 1, 2017 Filing 1113 Unopposed MOTION for protective order by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (subpoena))(Lee, Lynn)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1112 CLERK'S certificate of destruction of exhibits and/or exhibit substitutes as to Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (LMD)
March 17, 2017 Filing 1111 PLAINTIFF EXHIBITS ONLY: The records in this case indicate that this case was disposed of more than thirty (30) days ago. The records also indicate that the Clerk's Office is in possession of various exhibits used during the proceedings. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.04, you are notified that you have thirty (30) days for the removal of the exhibits from the custody of the Clerk's Office, or the exhibits will be destroyed, as permitted by Local Rule 5.04. (AMD)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 ORDER granting #1109 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/17/2016. (SKH)
November 17, 2016 Filing 1109 Unopposed MOTION for protective order by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - subpoena)(Lee, Lynn)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 ORDER ATTACHED granting #1106 Unopposed Non-Party Claimant Benedicto Romero Barrera's Motion for Relief From Judgment Garnishment. See written order for full details. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/18/2016. (DMB)
October 17, 2016 Filing 1107 RESPONSE to Motion re #1106 MOTION for relief from judgment (agreeing to requested relief) filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
October 17, 2016 Filing 1106 MOTION for relief from judgment by Benedicto Romero Barrera. (Diaz, Richard)
October 17, 2016 Filing 1105 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Diaz on behalf of Benedicto Romero Barrera (Diaz, Richard)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 ORDER ATTACHED granting #1103 the Motion to Substitute Proper Party and substituting Judith Janis, as Personal Representative and sole heir of the Estate of Greer Janis, as the proper party Plaintiff for Greer Janis who is now deceased. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/12/2016. (DMB)
September 12, 2016 Filing 1103 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party and Suggestion of Death of Plaintiff Greer Janis by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Colorado Death Certificate Greer Janis, #2 Exhibit Colorado Letters of Administration to Judith Janis)(Korvick, Tony)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 ORDER ATTACHED denying #1101 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/8/2016. (DMB)
February 4, 2016 Filing 1101 First MOTION for permanent injunction pursuant to the All Writs Act and the Anti-Injunction Act by TERRABANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Release Order, #3 Exhibit SDNT Parties' Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit Order on Motion to Remand)(Swanson, Edrei)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 ENDORSED ORDER granting #1099 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Avi Robert Kaufman of Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A. is relieved of any further responsibility in the case. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/1/2016. (SKH)
January 29, 2016 Filing 1099 MOTION for Avi R. Kaufman to withdraw as attorney by HSBC Bank, USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Avi)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 ORDER ATTACHED granting #1097 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Approving Real Property Execution Sales, Canceling Lis Pendens, and Directing Delivery of U.S. Marshal's Deeds. See written order for complete details. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/20/2015. (DMB)
November 19, 2015 Filing 1097 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically APPROVING REAL PROPERTY EXECUTION SALES, CANCELING LIS PENDENS, AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF MARSHAL'S DEEDS by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Korvick, Tony)
November 17, 2015 Filing 1096 NOTICE of compliance Proof of Publication of USMS Notice of Sales for Nov 18 sales date in compliance with Fla Stat 56.21 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proof of publication)(Korvick, Tony)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 ORDER granting #1094 Motion for Protective Order in accordance with the attached order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/12/2015. (CCB)
November 12, 2015 Filing 1094 Unopposed MOTION for protective order by USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lynn)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 ORDER of USCA: Motion to dismiss appeal as moot filed by Appellants Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Judith G. Janis, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis and Michael I. Janis is GRANTED. The parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs as to #1064 Notice of appeal filed by Keith Stansell, Greer C. Janis, Marc Gonsalves, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis. EOD: 10/29/15; USCA number: 15-13774-DD. (JNB)
October 29, 2015 Filing 1092 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell of Filing Agreed-To Motion to Dismiss Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appellants' Agreed-To Motion to Dismiss Appeal)(Korvick, Tony)
October 13, 2015 Filing 1091 NOTICE of compliance Plaintiffs' Affidavit to USMS in compliance with Fla Stat 56.27 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiffs' Affidavit to USMS in compliance with Fla Stat 56.27)(Korvick, Tony)
October 13, 2015 Filing 1090 NOTICE of compliance USMS certified mail envelopes to property owners, counsel and tenants in compliance with Fla Stat 56.21 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USMS certified mail envelopes to property owners, attorneys, and tenants)(Korvick, Tony)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER granting #1088 Motion for Order of Sale. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/8/2015. (SKH)
October 8, 2015 Filing 1088 Unopposed MOTION for Order of Sale DIRECTING U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE TO RESET REAL PROPERTY SALE DATE (each parcel of real property is to be sold separately) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Notice of Sales)(Korvick, Tony)
October 6, 2015 Filing 1087 Notification from the U.S. Court of Appeals, 11th Circuit, that WRIT OF CERTIORARI has been denied by the U.S. Supreme Court as to #640 Notice of appeal filed by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera Issued on 10/6/15. The court's mandate having previously issued, no further action will be taken by this court. (JNB)
October 6, 2015 Filing 1086 Notification from the U.S. Court of Appeals, 11th Circuit, that WRIT OF CERTIORARI has been denied by the U.S. Supreme Court as to #851 Notice of appeal filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Issued on 10/5/15. The court's mandate having previously issued, no further action will be taken by this court. (JNB)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1085 NOTICE OF EXHIBITS placed in the Exhibit Room (1 envelope-Evidentiary hearing) by Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (BSN)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1084 NOTICE of deposition of H. Josh Rodstein and David Shimko filed in paper format in clerk's office. Placed on file shelf. (Attachments: #1 Deposition)(BSN)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 ORDER denying #1068 Motion for Disbursement of Funds; granting #1071 Motion to Vacate. The Marshal's sale conducted on 8/26/15, in Miami, Florida, with regard to the sale of three parcels of real property owned by Salmon Coral Way Partners and one parcel of real property owned by C.W. Salmon Partners, is vacated and set aside. The Marshal for the Southern District of Florida is directed to return the full bid proceeds of $1,800,000.00 to the highest bidder at the sale, East Coast Financial, LLC, within 10 business days of this order. The Plaintiffs are directed to file another motion before the Court rescheduling the sale of the real property at issue on the condition that any notice of sale shall clearly state that each parcel of real property is to be sold separately. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/2/2015. (SKH)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1082 Exhibit List by Keith Stansell, et al. (MSS)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1081 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Lazzara: Evidentiary Hearing held on 10/2/2015. Court Reporter: Claudia Spangler-Fry (MSS)
October 1, 2015 Filing 1080 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re #1076 Order pdf Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Hearing Memorandum filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 ORDER granting #1078 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/18/2015. (SKH)
September 18, 2015 Filing 1078 Unopposed MOTION for protective order requested by US Marshal's Service by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order US Marshal's proposed Confidentiality Protective Order)(Korvick, Tony)
September 4, 2015 Filing 1077 NOTICE of Evidentiary Hearing on #1071 Amended Motion to Vacate, and #1068 Motion for Order Directing U.S. Marshal's Distribution of Real Property Execution Sale Proceeds set for 10/2/2015 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Richard A. Lazzara. (CCB)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 ORDER ATTACHED setting evidentiary hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Directing U.S. Marshal's Distribution of Real Property Execution Sale Proceeds (Dkt. 1068) and Claimants' Corrected Motion to Vacate Sale of Real Property (Dkt. 1071) on Friday October 2, 2015, at 9:00 a.m., continuing the balance of the day. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/4/2015. (CCB)
September 4, 2015 Filing 1075 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1068 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL'S DISTRIBUTION OF REAL PROPERTY EXECUTION SALE PROCEEDS CORRECTED RESPONSE filed by C.W. Salman Partners, Granada Associates, Inc., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners. (Klugh, Richard)
September 3, 2015 Filing 1074 **TERMINATED; ATTORNEY REFILED CORRECTED RESPONSE AT #1075 ** RESPONSE in Opposition re #1068 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL'S DISTRIBUTION OF REAL PROPERTY EXECUTION SALE PROCEEDS filed by C.W. Salman Partners, Granada Associates, Inc., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners. (Klugh, Richard) Modified on 9/4/2015 (RFK).
September 3, 2015 Filing 1073 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1071 Amended MOTION to Vacate #1066 Compliance notice filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #1069 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/28/2015.(DMB)
August 27, 2015 Filing 1071 Amended MOTION to Vacate #1066 Compliance notice by C.W. Salman Partners, Granada Associates, Inc., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - property record, #3 Exhibit C - property record, #4 Exhibit D - property record, #5 Exhibit E - property record)(Klugh, Richard)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 ENDORSED ORDER directing that, on or before 9/3/15, Third Party Claimsnts shall file an expedited response to #1068 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Directing U.S. Marshal's Distribution of Real Property Execution Sale Proceeds and Plaintiffs shall file an expedited response to #1069 Third Party Claimants' Objection to and Motion to Vacate Sale of Real Property. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/27/2015. (DMB)
August 27, 2015 Filing 1069 Third Party MOTION to Vacate #1067 Notice (Other), #1066 Compliance notice by C.W. Salman Partners, Granada Associates, Inc., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit B - property record, #3 Exhibit C - property record, #4 Exhibit D - property record, #5 Exhibit E - property record)(Klugh, Richard)
August 27, 2015 Filing 1068 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL'S DISTRIBUTION OF REAL PROPERTY EXECUTION SALE PROCEEDS by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1067 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell Notice of Filing U.S. Marshal's 285 Form for August 26, 2015 Real Property Execution Sale (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USM 285 for Aug 26, 2015 Execution Sale)(Korvick, Tony)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1066 NOTICE of compliance with Fla. Stat. 56.27(4) by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit Regarding Execution on Real Property, #2 Exhibit transmittal letter to SDFL Marshal)(Korvick, Tony)
August 26, 2015 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding USCA appeal fees received re #1064 Notice of appeal USCA number: 15-13774-D. (BSN)
August 25, 2015 USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number tpa31879 re #1064 Notice of appeal filed by Keith Stansell, Greer C. Janis, Marc Gonsalves, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis (ARC)
August 24, 2015 Filing 1065 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #1064 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (BSN)
August 21, 2015 Filing 1064 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1056 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefOrder on motion for judgment by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. Filing fee not paid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order DE 1056)(Porter, Newton)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #1062 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/21/2015. (CCB)
August 21, 2015 Filing 1062 Third Party MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Reset Sale by Granada Associates, Inc., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh. (Klugh, Richard)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 ORDER ATTACHED denying #1058 Motion to Reset the Sale of Property Pending Resolution of the Petitions for Writ of Certiorari. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/21/2015. (CCB)
August 21, 2015 Filing 1060 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1058 Third Party MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Reset Sale of Real Estate Pending Resolution of Certiorari Petitions Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Motion to Reset Sale Date filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiffs to respond to #1058 Third Party Motion for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Reset Sale of Real Estate Pending Resolution of Certiorari Petitions. EXPEDITED RESPONSE due on or before 8/24/2015 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 8/21/2015. (SKH)
August 21, 2015 Filing 1058 Third Party MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Reset Sale of Real Estate Pending Resolution of Certiorari Petitions by Granada Associates, Inc., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Miriam Sutherlin. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Supreme Court dockets, #2 Appendix B - Supreme Court Reply Brief in 14-1342)(Klugh, Richard)
August 20, 2015 Filing 1057 NOTICE of compliance re #1018 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief F.S. 56.21 Proof of Publication and Service of Notice of Sale on Florida Real Property Execution Sale by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Daily Business Review Proof of Publication, #2 Exhibit USMS certifed mail service of Notice of Sale)(Korvick, Tony)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 ORDER ATTACHED granting #1030 Claimant Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl's Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment; dissolving #980the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas for lack of jurisdiction; granting #1052 Claimant Golfrate Holdings (Angola) LDA's Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment; dissolving #1000 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to Commerzbank AG for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #902 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to AHLI United Bank UK PLC for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #903 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to BNP Paribas Dubai for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #904 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to BNP Paribas New York Branch for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #905 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to BNP Paribas RCC, Inc., as Agent for BNP Paribas New York Branch for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #906 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to JP Morgan Chase & Co. for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #907 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #909 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #910 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to HSBC Bank USA, N.A.sua sponte for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #911 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to HSBC Bank USA, N.A.for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #914 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to JPMorgan Chase Bank for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #915 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to Standard Chartered Bank for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #930 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to The Bank of New York Mellon for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #934 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to JP Morgan Chase Bank for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #935 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to JP Morgan Chase Bank for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #936 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to JP Morgan Chase Bank for lack of jurisdiction; dissolving sua sponte #1001 the Writ of Garnishment issued with respect to Commerzbank AG for lack of jurisdiction; denying as moot #983 #984 #991 #992 #993 Plaintiffs' Motions for TRIA Turnover Judgments inasmuch as they relate to Writs that have now been dissolved due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction; and denying as moot #961 Claimants Kassim Tajideen, Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes SARL, and Ovlas Trading, S.A.'s Motion to Dissolve Writs of Garnishment inasmuch as the corresponding Writs have now been dissolved above due to the Court's lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 7/22/2015. (DMB)
July 15, 2015 Filing 1055 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1052 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Dissolve Writ of Garnishment DE 1000 filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
July 15, 2015 Filing 1054 NOTICE of compliance Fla. Stat. 77.055 Notice served June 19, 2015 Answer DE 1037 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FS77.055 Notice, Ans. DE 1037, #2 Exhibit USPS FCMI Receipt)(Porter, Newton)
July 15, 2015 Filing 1053 CERTIFICATE of compliance with F.S. 77.041 service of Motion DE 998 and writs DE 1000-1001 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS FCIM receipt)(Korvick, Tony)
July 8, 2015 Filing 1052 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Dissolve Writ of Garnishment DE 1000 by Golfrate Holdings (Angola) LDA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kassim Tajideen Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Chibli Mallat Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Warde Report)(Swanson, Joseph)
July 8, 2015 Filing 1051 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Bowker on behalf of Golfrate Holdings (Angola) LDA (Bowker, David)
July 8, 2015 Filing 1050 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Stuart Beene on behalf of Golfrate Holdings (Angola) LDA (Beene, Charles)
July 8, 2015 Filing 1049 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Quinn on behalf of Golfrate Holdings (Angola) LDA (Quinn, Robert)
July 8, 2015 Filing 1048 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Warren Swanson on behalf of Golfrate Holdings (Angola) LDA (Swanson, Joseph)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 ORDER ATTACHED denying without prejudice #1034 Motion to Strike and Exclude; denying without prejudice #1045 Motion to Compel; and staying all proceedings pending resolution of the substantive jurisdictional issue. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/19/2015. (DMB)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 ENDORSED ORDER denying #1040 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Claimant's Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment #1030 by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/19/2015. (DMB)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1045 MOTION to Compel Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference and Deposition of Plaintiffs' Expert Douglas C. Farah by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Swanson, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
June 18, 2015 Filing 1044 RESPONSE re #1019 Order Directing Briefing on the Jurisdictional Question filed by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen. (Swanson, Joseph)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1043 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment (Amended) by Standard Chartered Bank. (Glickman, Barry)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1042 RESPONSE re #1019 Order Directing Briefing on the Issue of the Court's In Rem Jurisdiction filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1041 RESPONSE re #1019 Order Directing Briefing on the Issue of the Court's In Rem Jurisdiction filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Mullins, Edward)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1040 MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief in Support of Claimant's Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment (DE 1030) by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl. (Swanson, Joseph)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1039 RESPONSE re #1019 Order and Memorandum of Law in Compliance with the Court's Order dated May 21, 2015 Concerning the Court's Jurisdiction Over Funds Held in Accounts Outside Florida filed by COMMERZBANK AG, NEW YORK BRANCH. (Hudson, Phillip)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1038 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment /Execution and Affirmative Defenses re TAJCO by COMMERZBANK AG, NEW YORK BRANCH. (Hudson, Phillip)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1037 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment /Execution and Affirmative Defenses re GOLFRATE HOLDINGS (ANGOLA) LDA by COMMERZBANK AG, NEW YORK BRANCH. (Hudson, Phillip)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1036 RESPONSE re #1019 Order concerning the Court's jurisdiction over accounts held outside of the State of Florida filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morreale, Frank)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1035 RESPONSE re #1019 Order Memorandum of Law in compliance with order of this Court dated May 21, 2015 concerning this Court's jurisdiction over funds held outside the territorial limits of Florida by Standard Chartered Bank. (Glickman, Barry)
June 17, 2015 Filing 1034 MOTION to Strike #891 Affidavit and Exclude Testimony by Plaintiffs' Expert Douglas C. Farah by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen. (Quinn, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
June 17, 2015 Filing 1033 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1030 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Dissolve Writ of Garnishment DE 980 filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
June 17, 2015 Filing 1032 NOTICE of compliance Fla.Stat.77.055 Notice Served May 20, 2015 DBTCA Answer DE 1017 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FS 77.055 Notice, #2 Exhibit USPS FCMI May 20, 2015 Receipt)(Porter, Newton)
June 9, 2015 Filing 1031 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation Response and Objections to Plaintiffs' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in Civil Action (Campbell, Dennis)
June 8, 2015 Filing 1030 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Dissolve Writ of Garnishment DE 980 by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kassim Tajideen Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Chibli Mallat Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Warde Report)(Swanson, Joseph)
June 4, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Gregory S. Nieberg, appearing on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA030498.) Related document: #1012 MOTION for Gregory S. Nieberg to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
June 4, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Mark P. Gimbel, appearing on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA030498.) Related document: #1012 MOTION for Mark P. Gimbel to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
June 4, 2015 Filing 1029 RESPONSE re #1019 Order Plaintiffs' Response to May 21, 2015 Order on Jurisdiction filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JPMCB 2011 resp. 0001)(Porter, Newton)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 ENDORSED ORDER granting #1027 unopposed motion to extend time to June 26, 2015 to answer or otherwise respond to Writs of Garnishment by COMMERZBANK AG, NEW YORK BRANCH. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/29/2015. (DMB)
May 29, 2015 Filing 1027 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to June 26, 2015 to answer or otherwise respond to Writs of Garnishment by COMMERZBANK AG, NEW YORK BRANCH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hudson, Phillip)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 ORDER granting and approving Stipulation #1024 regarding withdrawal of Amended Answer to Writ of Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/26/2015. (SKH)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 ORDER granting and approving Stipulation #1023 regarding withdrawal of Amended Answer to Writ of Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/26/2015. (SKH)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Withdrawal of Amended Answer to Writ of Garnishment by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward)
May 22, 2015 Filing 1023 STIPULATION re #1015 Answer to Writ of Garnishment Withdrawal of Amended Answer by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Mullins, Edward)
May 22, 2015 Filing 1022 RESPONSE to Motion re #993 MOTION for TRIA Turnover judgment on Garnishee JPMCB Answer DE 946 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward)
May 22, 2015 Filing 1021 RESPONSE to Motion re #992 MOTION for TRIA Turnover judgment JPMCB Answer DE 949 Tajco filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward)
May 22, 2015 Filing 1020 RESPONSE to Motion re #991 MOTION for TRIA Turnover judgment JPMCB Answer DE 950 Grand Stores filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 ORDER ATTACHED directing Plaintiffs to file a memorandum of law, on or before 6/4/15, with regard to the issue of whether this Court has jurisdiction to issue a writ of garnishment pursuant to Florida's garnishment statute seeking to garnish funds held in accounts outside the territorial limits of the State of Florida and directing all garnishees who are currently subject to writs of garnishment issued by this Court with respect to funds held in accounts outside the State of Florida, as well as those parties who are contesting garnishment proceedings with respect to those funds to file their memoranda of law as to the jurisdictional issue on or before 6/18/15. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/21/2015. (DMB)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 ORDER ATTACHED granting #994 Plaintiffs' Motion to Discharge Lis Pendens and for Order directing the U.S. Marshal to reset real property execution sale. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/20/2015. (SKH)
May 19, 2015 Filing 1017 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morreale, Frank)
May 19, 2015 Filing 1016 NOTICE to counsels Mark P. Gimbel and Gregory S. Nieberg of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (BSN)
May 18, 2015 Filing 1015 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Amended Answer of Garnishee The Bank of New York Mellon to Writ of Execution Garnishment Relating to Grupo Arposfran Empre Particacoes and Ovlas Trading, S.A. by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Mullins, Edward)
May 18, 2015 Filing 1014 RESPONSE to Motion re #983 MOTION for TRIA Turnover Judgment on Garnishee BNYM Answer DE 942 to writ DE 930 judgment on SDGT Grupo Arosfran filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Mullins, Edward)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 ENDORSED ORDER granting #1012 MOTION for Mark P. Gimbel and Gregory S. Nieberg to appear pro hac vice by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/18/2015. (DMB)
May 18, 2015 Filing 1012 MOTION for Mark P. Gimbel and Gregory S. Nieberg to appear pro hac vice by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morreale, Frank)
May 18, 2015 Filing 1011 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Edward Morreale on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Morreale, Frank)
May 15, 2015 Filing 1010 PROOF of service by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
May 15, 2015 Filing 1009 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #1002 Reply to Response to Motion Plaintiffs' Surreply to DE 1002 filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 ORDER granting #1007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gregory W. Kehoe and Terry R. Weiss terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/15/2015. (SKH)
May 14, 2015 Filing 1007 Unopposed MOTION for Terry R. Weiss and Gregory W. Kehoe to withdraw as attorney for Brunello Ltd. by Brunello, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order Granting Withdrawal)(Weiss, Terry)
May 14, 2015 Filing 1006 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry Jay Glickman on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Glickman, Barry)
May 13, 2015 Filing 1005 RESPONSE in Opposition re #993 MOTION for TRIA Turnover judgment on Garnishee JPMCB Answer DE 946, #983 MOTION for TRIA Turnover Judgment on Garnishee BNYM Answer DE 942 to writ DE 930 judgment on SDGT Grupo Arosfran, #984 MOTION for TRIA Turnover Judgment on Garnishee SCB Answer DE 943 to writ DE 915 judgment for SDGT Grupo Arosfran filed by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen. (Quinn, Robert)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 ENDORSED ORDER granting #1003 Motion for Leave to File five-page Surreply to DE 1002 by all Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/12/2015. (SKH)
May 12, 2015 Filing 1003 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to File 5 Page Surreply to DE 1002 by All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Newton)
May 11, 2015 Filing 1002 REPLY to Response to Motion re #961 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment filed by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Tajideen Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Mallat Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Warde Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Warde Report, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Warde Report, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Warde Report, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Warde Report, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Warde Report, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Warde Report, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Warde Report, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Warde Report, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Warde Report, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Warde Report, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Warde Report, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Warde Report, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Warde Report, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Warde Report)(Quinn, Robert)
May 8, 2015 Filing 1001 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED Commerzbank AG, New York Branch as to Tajco a/k/a LTD. a/k/a/ Tajco Sarl a/k/a Tajco Company a/k/a Tajco Company LLC a/k/a Tradex Co, (or any alias thereof). (RFK) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
May 8, 2015 Filing 1000 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to Commerzbank AG, New York Branch as to Golfrate Holdings (Angola) LDA. (RFK) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 999 ORDER granting #998 motion for issuance. The Clerk is directed to issue the Writ of Garnishment as set forth in Exhibits 1 and 2 of the Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/8/2015. (RFK)
May 8, 2015 Filing 998 MOTION for issuance of IEEPA/SDGT TRIA Writs of Garnishment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed TRIA Writ, #2 Exhibit Proposed TRIA Writ, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Porter, Newton) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
May 7, 2015 Filing 997 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Warren Swanson on behalf of Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen (Swanson, Joseph)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 996 ORDER granting #969 Motion for entry of TRIA Turnover Judgment on #937 answer of Garnishee BNP Paribas NY Branch. (Turnover Judgment on answer to writ of garnishment attached). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/5/2015. (MSS)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 995 ORDER granting #967 Motion for entry of TRIA Turnover judgment on #933 answer of Garnishee Interaudi Bank (Turnover Judgment on answer to writ of garnishment attached). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/5/2015. (MSS)
May 5, 2015 Filing 994 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Discharge Notices of Lis Pendens and for Entry of Order Directing U.S. Marshal to Reset Real Property Execution Sale by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Property Owners' Notices of Lis Pendens (4))(Korvick, Tony)
May 5, 2015 Filing 993 MOTION for TRIA Turnover judgment on Garnishee JPMCB Answer DE 946 by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
May 5, 2015 Filing 992 MOTION for TRIA Turnover judgment JPMCB Answer DE 949 Tajco by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JPMC Blocking Information Tajco)(Porter, Newton)
May 5, 2015 Filing 991 MOTION for TRIA Turnover judgment JPMCB Answer DE 950 Grand Stores by All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Newton)
May 5, 2015 Filing 990 Notification from the U.S. Court of Appeals, 11th Circuit, that WRIT OF CERTIORARI has been denied by the U.S. Supreme Court as to #731 Notice of appeal filed by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., Miriam Sutherlin, Sandra Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Ricardo Jaar, MLA Investments Inc., Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Overseas, Inc., Carmen Siman, Armando Jaar, C.W. Salman Partners, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc., Salman Coral Way Partners, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Laura Saieh, Abdala Saieh, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Jacaria Florida, Inc., Confecciones Lord S.A., Moises Saieh, Kathya Saieh, #728 Notice of appeal filed by Miriam Sutherlin, Sandra Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jamce Investments, Ltd., Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Kathya Saieh Issued on 5/4/15. The court's mandate having previously issued, no further action will be taken by this court. (JNB)
May 4, 2015 Filing 989 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). Counsel needs to register for a CM/ECF login to file and receive documents electronically. (BSN)
May 4, 2015 Filing 988 NOTICE to counsel Barry J. Glickman of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). Counsel needs to submit Special Admission Certification form and filing fee. (BSN)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 987 ENDORSED ORDER granting #986 Claimants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to #982 Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to #961 Claimants' Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment. Claimants shall file their five-page reply on or before 5/11/15. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/1/2015. (DMB)
April 30, 2015 Filing 986 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #961 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment , #982 Response in Opposition to Motion by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen. (Quinn, Robert)
April 29, 2015 Filing 985 NOTICE of compliance Fla. Stat. 77.041 Writ DE 980 and Motion by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS FCIM receipt)(Porter, Newton)
April 29, 2015 Filing 984 MOTION for TRIA Turnover Judgment on Garnishee SCB Answer DE 943 to writ DE 915 judgment for SDGT Grupo Arosfran by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
April 29, 2015 Filing 983 MOTION for TRIA Turnover Judgment on Garnishee BNYM Answer DE 942 to writ DE 930 judgment on SDGT Grupo Arosfran by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
April 29, 2015 Filing 982 RESPONSE in Opposition re #961 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 981 ORDER granting #953 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of TRIA Turnover Judgment on #923 Answer of Garnishee HSBC Bank, USA, N.A. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/29/2015. (SKH)
April 29, 2015 Filing 980 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as to Grupo Arposfran Empre Particacoes. (AG) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 979 ORDER granting #952 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of TRIA Turnover Judgment on #922 Answer of Garnishee HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/29/2015. (SKH)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ORDER granting #971 motion for issuance of TRIA Writ of Garnishment Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. The Clerk is directed to issue the Writ of Garnishment as set forth in the Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/29/2015. (AG)
April 28, 2015 Filing 977 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #914 Writ of garnishment issued, #913 Writ of garnishment issued, #906 Writ of garnishment issued Notice of withdrawal of writs DE 906, 913, 914 to JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Korvick, Tony)
April 28, 2015 Filing 976 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #907 Writ of garnishment issued Notice of withdrawal of Writ DE 907 to The Bank of New York Mellon CORP. (Korvick, Tony)
April 28, 2015 Filing 975 PROOF of service by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
April 28, 2015 Filing 974 PROOF of service by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
April 28, 2015 Filing 973 PROOF of service by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
April 28, 2015 Filing 972 PROOF of service by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
April 28, 2015 Filing 971 MOTION for issuance of Motion to Issue TRIA Writ of Garnishment Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed TRIA Writ of Garnishment, #2 Exhibit Treasury SDGT List, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Issuing TRIA Writ)(Porter, Newton) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
April 27, 2015 Filing 970 Reply to re #942 Answer to Writ of Garnishment filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony) Modified on 4/28/2015 to edit text. (AG)
April 22, 2015 Filing 969 MOTION for judgment on Garnishee BNPP-NY Answer DE 937 to writ of execution/garnishment DE 904 by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
April 21, 2015 Filing 968 PROOF of service by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
April 21, 2015 Filing 967 MOTION for TRIA Turnover Judgment judgment on Garnishee Interaudi Bank Answer DE 933 by All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Newton)
April 21, 2015 Filing 966 PROOF of service by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
April 17, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney David W. Bowker, appearing on behalf of Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA029631.) Related document: #963 MOTION for David W. Bowker to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
April 17, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Charles Beene, appearing on behalf of Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA029631.) Related document: #962 MOTION for Charles Beene to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 965 ENDORSED ORDER granting #963 MOTION for David W. Bowker to appear pro hac vice by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/17/2015. (DMB) Modified on 4/17/2015 (DMB).
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 964 ENDORSED ORDER granting #962 MOTION for Charles Beene to appear pro hac vice by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/17/2015. (DMB)
April 16, 2015 Filing 963 MOTION for David W. Bowker to appear pro hac vice by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen. (Quinn, Robert)
April 16, 2015 Filing 962 MOTION for Charles Beene to appear pro hac vice by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen. (Quinn, Robert)
April 16, 2015 Filing 961 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment by Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A., Kassim Tajideen. (Quinn, Robert)
April 16, 2015 Filing 960 NOTICE of Appearance Appearance by Robert M. Quinn on behalf of Kassim Tajideen, Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes Sarl, Ovlas Trading, S.A. (Quinn, Robert)
April 16, 2015 Filing 959 NOTICE of compliance Fla. Stat. 77.055 JPMCB Answer DE 950 Notice Cert. Svc. Served April 13, 2015 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FS 77.055 Notice JPMCB Answer DE 950 Cert. Svc., #2 Exhibit USPS.FCMI.Notice.Answer DE 950)(Porter, Newton)
April 16, 2015 Filing 958 NOTICE of compliance Fla.Stat.77.055 JPMCB Answer DE 949 Notice.Cert.Svc. Served April 13, 2015 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FS 77.055 Notice JPMCB Answer DE 949 cert. Svc., #2 Exhibit USPS.FCMI.Notice.Answer DE949)(Porter, Newton)
April 16, 2015 Filing 957 NOTICE of compliance Fla. Stat.77.055 JPMCB Answer DE 946 Notice Cert.Svc. Served April 13, 2015 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FS.77.055.Compliance.JPMCB.AnswDE946.Notice.Cert.Svc, #2 Exhibit USPS.FCMI.FS77.055.DE946)(Porter, Newton)
April 15, 2015 Filing 956 NOTICE by HSBC Bank, USA re #953 MOTION for TRIA Turnover judgment HSBC Answer DE 923 Kanaa, #952 MOTION for TRIA Turnover judgment HSBC Answer DE 922 Grand Stores Of No Objection to Plaintiffs' Motions (Kaufman, Avi)
April 14, 2015 Filing 955 CERTIFICATE of compliance re #943 Answer to Writ of Garnishment FS 77.055 service of Notice and Answer on April 8, 2015 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FS 77.055 Notice, Answer and certificate of service, #2 Exhibit USPS receipt for FCMI service)(Korvick, Tony)
April 14, 2015 Filing 954 NOTICE of compliance re #942 Answer to Writ of Garnishment Fla. Stat. 77.055 Compliance BNY Mellon Answer DE 942, Notice Served April 8, 2015 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FS 77.055 Complaince Svc BNYM Answer DE 942 Notice, #2 Exhibit USPS FCMI receipt DE 942 Notice)(Porter, Newton)
April 14, 2015 Filing 953 MOTION for TRIA Turnover judgment HSBC Answer DE 923 Kanaa by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex.1 Proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment HSBC Answer DE 923 Kanaa)(Porter, Newton)
April 14, 2015 Filing 952 MOTION for TRIA Turnover judgment HSBC Answer DE 922 Grand Stores by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment HSBC Answer DE 922)(Porter, Newton)
April 13, 2015 Filing 951 PROOF of service by Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
April 13, 2015 Filing 950 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment - Execution Relating to Grand Stores by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward)
April 13, 2015 Filing 949 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment - Execution Relating to Tajco by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward)
April 13, 2015 Filing 948 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #945 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #947 Answer to Writ of Garnishment (Mullins, Edward)
April 13, 2015 Filing 947 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment - Execution Relating to GRAND STORES LTD by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward) COUNSEL NOTIFIED WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED, REFILING CORRECT DOCUMENT Modified on 4/13/2015 (BSN).
April 13, 2015 Filing 946 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment - Execution Relating to KASSIM TAJEDDINE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward)
April 13, 2015 Filing 945 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment - Execution Relating to TAJCO by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward)COUNSEL NOTIFIED COURT WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED, REFILING CORRECT DOCUMENT Modified on 4/13/2015 (BSN).
April 7, 2015 Filing 944 Written designation and consent to act by Barry J. Glickman on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank. Non-Resident Counsel: Barry J. Glickman. (BSN)
April 7, 2015 Filing 943 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Standard Chartered Bank. (BSN)
April 7, 2015 Filing 942 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment -Execution Relating to Grupo Arposfran Empre Particacoes and Ovlas Trading, S.A. by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Mullins, Edward)
April 2, 2015 Filing 941 CERTIFICATE of compliance with FS 77.055 for BNPP-NY Answer DE 937 to writ DE 904 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 77.055 Notice of right to move to dissolve writ served with Garnishee Answer DE 937, #2 Exhibit USPS receipt FCIM for service Ex. 1)(Korvick, Tony)
April 2, 2015 Filing 940 CERTIFICATE of compliance with FS 77.055 for BNYM Answer DE 925 to writ DE 907 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 77.055 Notice of right to move to dissolve writ served with Garnishee's Answer, #2 Exhibit USPS receipt for FCIM service)(Korvick, Tony)
April 2, 2015 Filing 939 CERTIFICATE of compliance with 77.041(2) on writs DE 930, 934, 935, 936 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 77.041 Notice to Individual served with writ DE 934)(Korvick, Tony)
April 1, 2015 Filing 938 NOTICE of compliance with FS 77.055 service of Garnishee Interaudi Bank Answer DE 933 and notice of right to dissolve writ by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 77.055 notice of answer and right to move to dissolve writ, #2 Exhibit USPS 1st class International Mail receipt for Ex. 1)(Korvick, Tony)
April 1, 2015 Filing 937 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Garnishee BNP Paribas-New York Branch to Writ DE 904 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
March 31, 2015 Filing 936 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA as to Tajco. (BSN) (BSN). Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
March 31, 2015 Filing 935 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA as to Grand Stores LTD(BSN) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
March 31, 2015 Filing 934 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA as to Kassim Tajeddine. (BSN) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
March 30, 2015 Filing 933 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell, Interaudi Bank re #912 Writ of garnishment issued of Filing Answer of Garnishee Interaudi Bank to writ DE 912 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Garnishee's authorization for ECF filing of its Answer by Plaintiffs' counsel)(Korvick, Tony)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 932 ORDER ATTACHED granting #931 motion for issuance of three writs of garnishment. The clerk is directed to issue the three writs set forth in exhibits 2, 3, and 4 to Plaintiffs' motion. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/30/2015. (SKH) Modified on 3/30/2015 (SKH).
March 30, 2015 Filing 931 Unopposed MOTION for issuance of Issuance of Writs of Execution/Garnishment to JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit proposed writ JPMCB, NA for Tajco, #3 Exhibit proposed writ JPMCB, NA for Grand Stores Ltd, #4 Exhibit proposed writ JPMCB, NA for Kassim Tajeddine)(Korvick, Tony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
March 27, 2015 Filing 930 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to The Bank of New York Mellon as to Grupo Arposfran Empre Particacoes or Ovlas Trading, S.A. (BSN) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 929 ORDER granting #928 motion for issuance of TRIA IEEPA/SDGT Writ of Garnishment. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue Writ of Execution/Garnishment so that Plaintiffs may promptly serve the writ. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/27/2015. (BSN)
March 27, 2015 Filing 928 Unopposed MOTION for issuance of Unopposed Motion to Issue IEEPA/SDGT Writ of Garnishment to The Bank of New York Mellon by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Writ of Garnishment, #2 Exhibit OFAC SDN List, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Issuing Writ)(Porter, Newton) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
March 26, 2015 Filing 927 NOTICE of compliance re #923 Answer to Writ of Garnishment Fla. Stat. 77.055 Compliance HSBC Answer DE 923, Notice Served March 20, 2015 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fla Stat 77.055 Answer DE 923, Notice, Certificate Service, #2 Exhibit USPS 1st class intl mail receipt)(Porter, Newton)
March 26, 2015 Filing 926 NOTICE of compliance re #922 Answer to Writ of Garnishment Fla.Stat. 77.055 HSBC Answer DE 922, Notice Served March 20, 2015 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fla Stat 77.055 Answer, Notice, Certificate Service, #2 Exhibit USPS 1st class intl mail receipt)(Porter, Newton)
March 26, 2015 Filing 925 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Relating to Grupo Arposfran Empre Particacoes and Ovlas Trading,S.A. by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Mullins, Edward)
March 19, 2015 Filing 924 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Credit Suisse AG. (Clabby, John)
March 19, 2015 Filing 923 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Fawzi Mustafa Kanan by HSBC Bank, USA. (Kaufman, Avi)
March 19, 2015 Filing 922 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Grand Stores, Ltd. by HSBC Bank, USA. (Kaufman, Avi)
March 19, 2015 Filing 921 NOTICE of compliance re #916 Certificate of compliance Notice of Filing U.S. POSTAL SERVICE INTERNATIONAL FIRST CLASS MAIL by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Receipt for First Class Intl Mail Service)(Korvick, Tony)
March 16, 2015 Filing 920 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation of Amended Response and Objections to Plaintifs' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Campbell, Dennis)
March 16, 2015 Filing 919 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation of Objections to Plaintiffs' Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Campbell, Dennis)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 918 ENDORSED ORDER that #901 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief and to Correct Clerical Mistake in Order and for Extension of Writ is denied for the reasons advanced in #917 Claimant Brunello, Ltd.'s Response to the Motion. The Court finds no reason to disturb its earlier Order #898. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/27/2015. (DMB)
February 26, 2015 Filing 917 RESPONSE in Opposition re #901 MOTION to Amend/Correct #898 Order on Motion to Deposit FundsOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Brunello, Ltd.. (Klugh, Richard)
February 26, 2015 Filing 916 CERTIFICATE of compliance re #914 Writ of garnishment issued, #913 Writ of garnishment issued, #902 Writ of garnishment issued, #908 Writ of garnishment issued, #903 Writ of garnishment issued, #909 Writ of garnishment issued, #907 Writ of garnishment issued, #912 Writ of garnishment issued, #915 Writ of garnishment issued, #906 Writ of garnishment issued, #905 Writ of garnishment issued, #911 Writ of garnishment issued, #910 Writ of garnishment issued, #904 Writ of garnishment issued Certificate of Service in compliance with Fla Stat 77.041(2) by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
February 20, 2015 Filing 915 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to Standard Chartered Bank as to Grupo Arposfran Empre Particacoes. (RFK) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
February 20, 2015 Filing 914 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to JP Morgan Chase & Co. as to Kassim Tajeddine. (RFK) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
February 20, 2015 Filing 913 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to JP Morgan Chase & Co. as to Grand Stores LTD. (RFK)
February 20, 2015 Filing 912 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to Interaudi Bank as to Faqzi Kanaa (Caracas, Venezuela). (RFK)
February 20, 2015 Filing 911 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to HSBC Bank USA, N.A. as to Grand Stores, LTD. (RFK) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
February 20, 2015 Filing 910 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to HSBC Bank USA, N.A. as to Faqzi Kanaa (Caracas, Venezuela). (RFK) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
February 20, 2015 Filing 909 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as to Grand Stores LTD. (RFK) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
February 20, 2015 Filing 908 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to Credit Suisse AG as to Grand Stores LTD. (RFK)
February 20, 2015 Filing 907 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation as to Grupo Arposfran Empre Particacoes. (RFK) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
February 20, 2015 Filing 906 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to JP Morgan Chase & Co. as to TAJCO. (RFK) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
February 20, 2015 Filing 905 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to BNP Paribas RCC, Inc., as Agent for BNP Paribas New York Branch as to Grand Stores LTD. (RFK) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
February 20, 2015 Filing 904 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to BNP Paribas New York Branch as to Grand Stores LTD. (RFK) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
February 20, 2015 Filing 903 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to BNP Paribas Dubai as to Grand Stores, LTD. (RFK) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
February 20, 2015 Filing 902 DISSOLVED PER #1056 ORDER WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED to AHLI United Bank UK PLC as to TAJCO. (RFK) Modified on 7/23/2015 (BSN).
February 19, 2015 Filing 901 MOTION to Amend/Correct #898 Order on Motion to Deposit FundsOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Automatic Extension (subject to this Motion))(Korvick, Tony)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 900 ORDER granting #892 Plaintiffs' Motion for Issuance of TRIA IEEPA/SDGT Writs of Garnishment. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue all fourteen (14) Writs of Execution/Garnishment so that Plaintiffs may promptly serve the writs. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/17/2015. (SKH)
January 27, 2015 Filing 899 NOTICE of compliance re #898 Order on Motion to Deposit FundsOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance with Order DE 898 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: official cashier's check, #2 Exhibit B: hand delivery receipt)(Korvick, Tony)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 898 ORDER ATTACHED granting #895 Claimant Brunello, Ltd's Motion for Entry of Order on Mandate; finding that #889 the mandate of the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals is now the Order of this Court; vacating #780#791 the turnover judgment entered May 6, 2013; quashing #403 the underlying writ of garnishment; directing Plaintiffs to return the turned over funds in the amount of $1,805,157.97 to counsel for Brunello, Ltd., within ten (10) days of the date of the Order; and denying as moot #886 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Deposit Funds Into Court Registry. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/26/2015.
January 26, 2015 Filing 897 RESPONSE to Motion re #895 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Order on Mandate Plaintiffs Response to Brunello Ltd. Motion DE 895 (additional language to the proposed order DE 895-1) filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
January 23, 2015 Filing 896 RESPONSE in Opposition re #886 MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by Brunello, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Concerning Brunello. Ltd.)(Klugh, Richard)
January 23, 2015 Filing 895 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Order on Mandate by Brunello, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klugh, Richard)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 894 ORDER granting #893 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/16/2015. (MSS)
January 14, 2015 Filing 893 Unopposed MOTION for protective order by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena, #2 Text of Proposed Order B - Proposed protective order)(Lee, Lynn)
January 14, 2015 Filing 892 MOTION for issuance of 09-cv-2308 Plaintiffs Motion for Issuance of IEEPA/SDGT TRIA Writs of Garnishment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OFAC Press release, #2 Exhibit OFAC Press Release, #3 Exhibit OFAC Press Release, #4 Exhibit OFAC Press Release, #5 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #6 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #7 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #8 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #9 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #10 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #11 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #12 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #13 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #14 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #15 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #16 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #17 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #18 Exhibit Proposed Writ, #19 Exhibit OFAC SDN List, #20 Exhibit OFAC SDN List, #21 Exhibit OFAC SDN List, #22 Exhibit OFAC SDN List, #23 Exhibit OFAC SDN List, #24 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Porter, Newton) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
January 14, 2015 Filing 891 AFFIDAVIT of Douglas C. Farah by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CV of Douglas C. Farah)(Korvick, Tony)
January 14, 2015 Filing 890 APPENDIX in Support of Post-Judgment Execution Against Agencies and Instrumentalities of the FARC, Vol. 2 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 74, #2 Exhibit 75, #3 Exhibit 76, #4 Exhibit 77, #5 Exhibit 78, #6 Exhibit 79, #7 Exhibit 80, #8 Exhibit 81, #9 Exhibit 82, #10 Exhibit 83, #11 Exhibit 84, #12 Exhibit 85, #13 Exhibit 86, #14 Exhibit 87, #15 Exhibit 88, #16 Exhibit 89, #17 Exhibit 90, #18 Exhibit 91, #19 Exhibit 92, #20 Exhibit 93, #21 Exhibit 94, #22 Exhibit 95, #23 Exhibit 96, #24 Exhibit 97, #25 Exhibit 98, #26 Exhibit 99.1, #27 Exhibit 99.2, #28 Exhibit 100, #29 Exhibit 101, #30 Exhibit 102, #31 Exhibit 103, #32 Exhibit 104, #33 Exhibit 105, #34 Exhibit 106, #35 Exhibit 107, #36 Exhibit 108, #37 Exhibit 109, #38 Exhibit 110, #39 Exhibit 111, #40 Exhibit 112, #41 Exhibit 113)(Korvick, Tony)
January 13, 2015 Filing 889 MANDATE of USCA. AFFIRMED in part and DISMISSED in part as to #640 Notice of appeal filed by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera, #773 Notice of appeal filed by Moises Saieh, Armando Jaar, Carlos Saieh, Carmen Siman, #819 Notice of appeal filed by Brunello, Ltd., #738 Notice of appeal filed by Plainview Florida II, Inc., C.W. Salman Partners, Salman Coral Way Partners, #731 Notice of appeal filed by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., Miriam Sutherlin, Sandra Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Ricardo Jaar, MLA Investments Inc., Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Overseas, Inc., Carmen Siman, Armando Jaar, C.W. Salman Partners, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc., Salman Coral Way Partners, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Laura Saieh, Abdala Saieh, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Jacaria Florida, Inc., Confecciones Lord S.A., Moises Saieh, Kathya Saieh, #827 Notice of appeal filed by Luis Sutherlin, #816 Notice of appeal filed by Sandra Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Saieh, Laura Saieh, Kathya Saieh, #728 Notice of appeal filed by Miriam Sutherlin, Sandra Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jamce Investments, Ltd., Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Kathya Saieh Issued as Mandate: 1/13/15 USCA number: 13-11339-AA ; 13-11959 -AA ; 13-12019 -AA ; 13-12116 -AA ; 13-12171 -AA ; 13-12337 -AA. (JNB)
January 12, 2015 Filing 888 NOTICE by Brunello, Ltd. of Filing Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Confirming Substitution of Counsel)(Klugh, Richard)
January 12, 2015 Filing 887 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Klugh on behalf of Brunello, Ltd. (Klugh, Richard)
January 6, 2015 Filing 886 MOTION to Deposit Funds by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
October 16, 2014 Filing 885 OPINION/ORDER of USCA:Decision: Affirmed in part and Dismissed in part. Motion for sanctions filed by Appellant Jose Ricuarte Diaz Herrera is DENIED as to #640 Notice of appeal filed by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera. EOD: 10/16/14; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 13-11339-AA. (JNB)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 884 ENDORSED ORDER granting #883 Motion to Withdraw as to Attorney Scott Risner. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/4/2013. (DMB)
November 4, 2013 Filing 883 MOTION for Scott Risner to withdraw as attorney by USA. (Risner, Scott)
October 24, 2013 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving RECORD on appeal (Documents 641-881) on 10/18/2013 re #773 Notice of appeal, #731 Notice of appeal, #827 Notice of appeal, #819 Notice of appeal, #738 Notice of appeal, #728 Notice of appeal. USCA number(s) 13-11959-AA, 13-12019-AA, 13-12116-AA, 13-12171-AA, 13-12337-AA. (RFK)
October 15, 2013 RECORD on appeal (Documents 641-881) (documents 1-640 were sent already) sent to USCA re #773 Notice of appeal, #731 Notice of appeal, #827 Notice of appeal, #819 Notice of appeal, #738 Notice of appeal, #728 Notice of appeal. Transmittal includes copy of docket sheet, volume of pleadings: 4, volume of exhibits: 1. USCA number 13-11959-AA, 13-12019-AA, 13-12116-AA, 13-12171-AA, 13-12337-AA (BSN)
October 14, 2013 Filing 882 STIPULATION and Notice of Full Compliance with Turnover Judgment by UBS AG. (Campbell, Dennis)
September 30, 2013 RECORD on appeal sent to USCA re #640 Notice of appeal. Transmittal includes copy of docket sheet, volume of pleadings: 9 volumes pleadings / 1 volume of Sealed pleadings, USCA number 13-11339-AA (RFK)
September 30, 2013 Filing 881 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #827 Notice of appeal. The following documents will be forwarded in paper format upon the request for the record on appeal by the USCA in addition to the electronic record. Volume of pleadings: 1 (forwarded to USCA with the record of 13-11339-AA) USCA number: 13-12337-AA (JNB)
September 30, 2013 Filing 880 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #819 Notice of appeal, #816 Notice of appeal. The following documents will be forwarded in paper format upon the request for the record on appeal by the USCA in addition to the electronic record. Volume of pleadings: 1 (forwarded to USCA with the record of 13-11339-AA) USCA number: 13-12171-AA (JNB)
September 30, 2013 Filing 879 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #773 Notice of appeal. The following documents will be forwarded in paper format upon the request for the record on appeal by the USCA in addition to the electronic record. Volume of pleadings: 1 (forwarded to USCA with the record of 13-11339-AA) USCA number: 13-12116-AA (JNB)
September 30, 2013 Filing 878 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #738 Notice of appeal. The following documents will be forwarded in paper format upon the request for the record on appeal by the USCA in addition to the electronic record. Volume of Sealed pleadings: 1 (forwarded to USCA with the record of 13-11339-AA) USCA number: 13-12019-AA (JNB)
September 30, 2013 Filing 877 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #731 Notice of appeal, #728 Notice of appeal. The following documents will be forwarded in paper format upon the request for the record on appeal by the USCA in addition to the electronic record. Volume of Sealed pleadings: 1 (forwarded to USCA with the record of 13-11339-AA) USCA number: 13-11959-AA (JNB)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER of USCA: Motion to dismiss case with prejudice filed by Appellant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA is GRANTED. Parties are to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees as to #851 Notice of appeal filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. EOD: 9/19/13; USCA number: 13-12642-AA. (JNB)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 875 ORDER of USCA: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Gregory William Kehoe is GRANTED by Supervisor. Attorney terminated: Attorney Gregory William Kehoe for Appellant Brunello, Ltd. in 13-12171, Attorney Terry R. Weiss for Appellant Brunello, Ltd. in 13-12171.; Motion for extension to file appellant brief is MOOT as to #819 Notice of appeal filed by Brunello, Ltd., #816 Notice of appeal filed by Sandra Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Saieh, Laura Saieh, Kathya Saieh. EOD: 8/21/13; USCA number: 13-12171-AA. (JNB)
July 31, 2013 Filing 874 STIPULATION and Notice of Further Partial Compliance With Turnover Judgment by Garnishee UBS AG by UBS AG. (Campbell, Dennis)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 873 ORDER of USCA: Appellants' motion for leave to exceed the page limit for their motion for stay pending appeal is GRANTED. Appellants' motion to stay the writs of execution relating to the commercial properties pending appeal is GRANTED as to #738 Notice of appeal filed by Plainview Florida II, Inc., C.W. Salman Partners, Salman Coral Way Partners. EOD: 7/9/13; USCA number: 13-12019-AA. (JNB)
July 8, 2013 Filing 872 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell of Compliance with Fla Stat 56.21 and 56.27 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in compliance with Fla Stat 56.27(4))(Korvick, Tony)
July 8, 2013 Filing 871 NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SALE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Daily Review affidavit of publication)(Korvick, Tony) Modified on 7/9/2013 (BSN).
June 28, 2013 Filing 870 SATISFACTION of judgment re #794 Order pdf, #795 Order pdf, #850 Order on motion for relief from judgmentOrder on Motion to Enforce Judgment, #793 Order pdf Satisfaction of TRIA Turnover Judgments JPMCB by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
June 26, 2013 Filing 869 NOTICE of settlement of Order DE 850, and TRIA Turnover Judgments DE 793 and 795, and JPMCB Notice of Appeal DE 851 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
June 21, 2013 Filing 868 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #841 Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds, #360 Writ Issued Notice of Filing Satisfaction of Stipulation Order and Writ of Garnishment re DE 841, 360 (Dotterrer, John)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ORDER granting #866 Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Stay of Execution. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/18/2013. (SKH)
June 17, 2013 Filing 866 MOTION to extend time to Stay Execution of Court's June 3, 2013 Order by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 865 ORDER ATTACHED denying #864 Third Party Claimants Jacqueline Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Laura Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Granada Associates, Inc., and Moises Saieh's motion for a stay pending appeal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/14/2013. (DMB)
June 14, 2013 Filing 864 Third Party MOTION to stay re #735 Order Denying Rule 60(b) Relief by Granada Associates, Inc., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh. (Klugh, Richard)
June 13, 2013 Filing 863 NOTICE of compliance re #755 Order on motion for judgment, #763 Judgment, #745 Order on motion for judgment, #756 Order on motion for judgment, #762 Judgment Stipulation and Notice of Compliance Turnover Judgments HSBC Bank by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Porter, Newton)
June 12, 2013 Filing 862 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #851 Notice of appeal. (Mullins, Edward)
June 11, 2013 Filing 861 PROOF of service by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
June 11, 2013 Filing 860 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Luis Sutherlin re #827 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 13-12337. (Bergendahl, John)
June 11, 2013 Filing 859 STIPULATION Stipulation and Notice of Compliance with Orders Concerning Turnover by Garnishee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Marc Gonsalves, HS AD, Inc., Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dotterrer, John)
June 11, 2013 Filing 858 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Sandra Saieh re #816 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 13-12171. (Klugh, Richard)
June 11, 2013 Filing 857 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Sandra Saieh re #842 Notice of appeal, #731 Notice of appeal, #736 Notice of appeal, #728 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 13-11959. (Klugh, Richard)
June 11, 2013 Filing 856 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Armando Jaar, Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh, Carmen Siman re #773 Notice of appeal, #843 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 13-12116. (Klugh, Richard)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 855 ORDER granting #854 Agreed Motion to Stay for approval of Supersedeas Bond for stay pending appeal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/11/2013. (SKH)
June 10, 2013 Filing 854 MOTION to stay Pending Appeal by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
June 7, 2013 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding Filing Fee paid receipt # TPA 17681 re #827 Notice of appeal USCA number: 13-12337-A. (BSN)
June 6, 2013 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number tpa17702 re #851 Notice of appeal filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (ARC)
June 6, 2013 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding Notice of Appeal Fees paid re #851 Notice of appeal (BSN)
June 5, 2013 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number tpa17681 re #827 Notice of appeal filed by Luis Sutherlin (ARC)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 853 ENDORSED ORDER granting #852 Unopposed Motion For Enlargement of 48-hour Execution Stay to Provide the Time Set Forth in the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. An extension of time is granted until 6/17/13. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/4/2013. (DMB)
June 4, 2013 Filing 852 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Enlargement of 48-hour Execution Stay to Provide JPMCB the Time Set Forth in the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward)
June 4, 2013 Filing 851 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #795 Order pdf, #850 Order on motion for relief from judgmentOrder on Motion to Enforce Judgment, #793 Order pdf by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Filing fee not paid. (Mullins, Edward)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 850 ORDER ATTACHED denying #828 Garnishee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Relief From Turnover Judgments and granting #834 Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Judgments. See written Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 6/3/2013. (DMB)
May 30, 2013 Filing 849 STIPULATION and Notice of Compliance with TRIA Turnover Order DE 780 and Statistical Judgment DE 791 by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc., Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
May 30, 2013 Filing 848 RESPONSE in Opposition re #834 MOTION to enforce judgment by Executions on Garnishee JPMCB filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mullins, Edward)
May 29, 2013 Filing 847 STIPULATION re #781 Order on motion for judgment, #792 Judgment and Notice of Compliance by Garnishee Oppenheimer by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
May 28, 2013 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #843 Notice of appeal. (BSN)
May 28, 2013 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #842 Notice of appeal. Filing Fee Not Paid (BSN)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 846 ENDORSED ORDER granting #845 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Motion for Fees and Costs by Banco Santander International. An extension is granted until 6/6/13. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/28/2013. (DMB)
May 28, 2013 Filing 845 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to File Motion for Fees and Costs by Banco Santander International. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Losego, Clinton)
May 28, 2013 Filing 844 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Brunello, Ltd. re #819 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 13-12171. (Kehoe, Gregory)
May 28, 2013 Filing 843 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #764 Judgment, #755 Order on motion for judgment, #763 Judgment, #396 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #327 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #775 Order on Motion to Alter JudgmentOrder on Motion for New Trial, #765 Judgment, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #757 Order on motion for judgment, #622 Order, #324 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #759 Order on motion for judgment, #635 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #756 Order on motion for judgment, #539 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #762 Judgment, #758 Order on motion for judgment, #766 Judgment, #459 Order on Motion to QuashOrder on motion for judgmentOrder on Motion to Vacate by Armando Jaar, Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh, Carmen Siman. Filing fee not paid. (Klugh, Richard) Modified on 6/4/2013 (BSN).
May 28, 2013 Filing 842 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #323 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #415 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #672 Order, #732 Order on Motion to Alter JudgmentOrder on Motion to Amend/CorrectOrder on Motion for New Trial, #727 Judgment, #735 Order, #725 Order on motion for judgment, #322 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #635 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #726 Order, #458 Judgment, #695 Order, #421 Order on Motion for Writ by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., C.W. Salman Partners, Confecciones Lord S.A., Granada Associates, Inc., Armando Jaar, Ricardo Jaar, Jacaria Florida, Inc., Jamce Investments, Ltd., Karen Overseas, Inc., MLA Investments Inc., Abdala Saieh, Amelia Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners, Carmen Siman, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Miriam Sutherlin, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc.. Filing fee not paid. (Klugh, Richard) Modified on 6/4/2013 (BSN).
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER ATTACHED granting #840 HS Ad, Inc.'s Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment and Motion for Order Releasing Funds (With Interest) Held by Wells Fargo to HS Ad, Inc.'s Counsel's Trust Account. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/24/2013. (DMB)
May 24, 2013 Filing 840 Third Party MOTION for Disbursement of Funds (with interest) held by Wells Fargo and Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment by HS AD, Inc.. (Comras, David)
May 24, 2013 Filing 839 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #834 MOTION to enforce judgment by Executions on Garnishee JPMCB of Filing Exhibit DE 834-1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DE 834-1 (inadvertently omitted from DE 834))(Korvick, Tony)
May 24, 2013 Filing 838 STIPULATION re #764 Judgment and Notice of Compliance with Turnover Judgment by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell, UBS AG. (Korvick, Tony)
May 24, 2013 Filing 837 STIPULATION re #768 Judgment, #767 Judgment, #765 Judgment, #766 Judgment and Notice of Compliance with Turnover Judgments by Bank of America, N.A., Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 836 ENDORSED ORDER that Garnishee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. shall file its response to #834 Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Judgments by Execution on or before Thursday, May 30, 2013. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/22/2013. (DMB)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER ATTACHED denying #832 Third Party Claimants C.W. Salman Partners and Salman Coral Way Partners' Motion to Stay Pending Appeal and granting #830 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Order Directing U.S. Marshal to Reset Real Property Execution Sale to Enforce Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/22/2013. (DMB) Modified to correct the attached Motion at Dkt. 830 rather than Motion at Dkt. 834 on 5/22/2013 (DMB).
May 22, 2013 Filing 834 MOTION to enforce judgment by Executions on Garnishee JPMCB by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
May 22, 2013 Filing 833 RESPONSE in Opposition re #828 MOTION for relief from judgment re #795 Order pdf, #793 Order pdf filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
May 21, 2013 Filing 832 MOTION to stay pending appeal by C.W. Salman Partners, Plainview Florida II, Inc., Salman Coral Way Partners. (Ferro, Simon)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER granting #829 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/21/2013. (SKH)
May 21, 2013 Filing 830 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Entry of Order Directing U.S. Marshal to Reset Real Property Execution Sale by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
May 21, 2013 Filing 829 Unopposed MOTION for protective order by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Risner, Scott)
May 21, 2013 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #827 Notice of appeal. (BSN)
May 21, 2013 wrong event code used. Modified on 5/21/2013 (BSN).
May 20, 2013 Filing 828 MOTION for relief from judgment re #795 Order pdf, #793 Order pdf by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mullins, Edward)
May 20, 2013 Filing 827 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #826 Order on Motion to Alter JudgmentOrder on Motion for New TrialOrder on motion to stayOrder on Motion to Vacate, #732 Order on Motion to Alter JudgmentOrder on Motion to Amend/CorrectOrder on Motion for New Trial, #727 Judgment, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #725 Order on motion for judgment, #635 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #326 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment by Luis Sutherlin. Filing fee not paid. (Bergendahl, John)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ORDER ATTACHED denying #815 Third Party Claimant Luis Sutherlin's Motion to Dissolve Writs of Garnishment, to Stay Garnishment Order, and Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59 to Alter Judgment and for New Trial. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/20/2013.(DMB)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ENDORSED ORDER granting #823 the Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Motion for Fees and Costs by Banco Santander International. A filing extension is granted until 5/30/13. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/20/2013. (DMB)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 824 ORDER of USCA: The Motion to adopt motion to stay is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The "Motion to Adopt..." is GRANTED to the extent the Saiehs seek to adopt the arguments in Brunello LTD.'s motion for stay pending appeal. The "Motion to Adopt..." is DENIED to the extent it is construed as a separate motion for stay pending appeal. Also, Brunello Ltd.'s "Motion for Stay of Execution...." Brunello Ltd.'s motion to stay the May 6, 2013, garnishment turnover judgment is DENIED as to #819 Notice of appeal filed by Brunello, Ltd., #816 Notice of appeal filed by Sandra Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Saieh, Laura Saieh, Kathya Saieh. EOD: 5/17/13; USCA number: 13-12171-AA. (JNB)
May 20, 2013 Filing 823 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to file motion for fees and costs by Banco Santander International. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Losego, Clinton)
May 17, 2013 Filing 822 REPLY to Response to Motion re #815 Third Party MOTION to Alter Judgment Third Party MOTION for New Trial Third Party MOTION to stay re #727 Judgment, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #725 Order on motion for judgment, #326 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #362 Writ Issued Third Party MOTION to Vacate #727 Judgment, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #725 Order on motion for judgment, #326 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #362 Writ Issued filed by Luis Sutherlin. (Bergendahl, John)
May 17, 2013 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding appeal filing fee paid re #816 Notice of appeal USCA number: 13-12171-AA. (JNB)
May 17, 2013 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding appeal filing fee paid re #773 Notice of appeal USCA number: 13-12116-A. (JNB)
May 17, 2013 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding appeal filing fee paid re #736 Notice of appeal USCA number: Unknown. (JNB)
May 17, 2013 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding appeal filing fee paid re #731 Notice of appeal USCA number: 13-11959-A. (JNB)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER of USCA: Motion to stay lower court proceedings filed by Appellants Carmen Siman, Armando Jaar, Moises Saieh and Carlos Saieh is DENIED as to #773 Notice of appeal filed by Moises Saieh, Armando Jaar, Carlos Saieh, Carmen Siman, #731 Notice of appeal filed by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., Miriam Sutherlin, Sandra Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Ricardo Jaar, MLA Investments Inc., Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Overseas, Inc., Carmen Siman, Armando Jaar, C.W. Salman Partners, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc., Salman Coral Way Partners, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Laura Saieh, Abdala Saieh, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Jacaria Florida, Inc., Confecciones Lord S.A., Moises Saieh, Kathya Saieh. EOD: 5/14/13; USCA number: 13-12116-A; 13-11959 -A. (JNB)
May 15, 2013 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number TPA17407 re #816 Notice of appeal filed by Sandra Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Saieh, Laura Saieh, Kathya Saieh (AG)
May 15, 2013 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number TPA17406 re #773 Notice of appeal filed by Moises Saieh, Armando Jaar, Carlos Saieh, Carmen Siman (AG)
May 15, 2013 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number TPA17405 re #736 Notice of appeal filed by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., Miriam Sutherlin, Sandra Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Ricardo Jaar, MLA Investments Inc., Jacqueline Saieh, Jamce Investments, Ltd., Karen Overseas, Inc., Carmen Siman, Armando Jaar, C.W. Salman Partners, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc., Salman Coral Way Partners, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Laura Saieh, Abdala Saieh, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Jacaria Florida, Inc., Confecciones Lord S.A., Moises Saieh, Kathya Saieh (AG)
May 15, 2013 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number TPA17403 re #731 Notice of appeal filed by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., Miriam Sutherlin, Sandra Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Ricardo Jaar, MLA Investments Inc., Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Overseas, Inc., Carmen Siman, Armando Jaar, C.W. Salman Partners, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc., Salman Coral Way Partners, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Laura Saieh, Abdala Saieh, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Jacaria Florida, Inc., Confecciones Lord S.A., Moises Saieh, Kathya Saieh (AG)
May 15, 2013 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #819 Notice of appeal. (JNB)
May 15, 2013 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #816 Notice of appeal. (JNB)
May 14, 2013 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number tpa17398 re #819 Notice of appeal filed by Brunello, Ltd. (ARC)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 820 ENDORSED ORDER granting #818 Motion for Leave to File Reply no longer than ten (10) pages in length on or before Friday, May 17, 2013. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/14/2013. (CCB)
May 14, 2013 Filing 819 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #791 Judgment, #780 Order on motion for judgment, #578 denying 567 Claimant Brunello Ltd.'s Motion to Dissolve and Motion to Quash Writ of Garnishment; granting 575 Plaintiffs' Limited Motion to Lift Stay and to Amend SDNT Writ of Garnishment (Dkt. 403), #396 ORDER granting 392 Motion for writ of garnishment. by Brunello, Ltd.. Filing fee not paid. (Kehoe, Gregory) Modified to include links to all orders appealed on 5/15/2013 (JNB).
May 14, 2013 Filing 818 Third Party MOTION for leave to file Reply by Luis Sutherlin. (Bergendahl, John)
May 14, 2013 Filing 817 RESPONSE in Opposition re #815 Third Party MOTION to Alter Judgment Third Party MOTION for New Trial Third Party MOTION to stay re #727 Judgment, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #725 Order on motion for judgment, #326 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #362 Writ Issued Third Party MOTION to Vacate #727 Judgment, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #725 Order on motion for judgment, #326 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #362 Writ Issued filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
May 14, 2013 Filing 816 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #396 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #791 Judgment, #622 Order, #635 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #578 Order on Motion to QuashOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #780 Order on motion for judgment, #809 Order on Motion to Alter JudgmentOrder on Motion to Amend/CorrectOrder on Motion for New Trial, #459 Order on Motion to QuashOrder on motion for judgmentOrder on Motion to Vacate by Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Sandra Saieh. Filing fee not paid. (Klugh, Richard)
May 13, 2013 Filing 815 Third Party MOTION to Alter Judgment , Third Party MOTION for New Trial , Third Party MOTION to stay re #727 Judgment, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #725 Order on motion for judgment, #326 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #362 Writ Issued , Third Party MOTION to Vacate #727 Judgment, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #725 Order on motion for judgment, #326 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #362 Writ Issued by Luis Sutherlin. (Bergendahl, John)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 814 ORDER of USCA: Motion to stay the lower court's April 25, 2013 judgment filed by Appellant ALM Investment Florida, Inc. is DENIED as to #731 Notice of appeal filed by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., Miriam Sutherlin, Sandra Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Ricardo Jaar, MLA Investments Inc., Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Overseas, Inc., Carmen Siman, Armando Jaar, C.W. Salman Partners, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc., Salman Coral Way Partners, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Laura Saieh, Abdala Saieh, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Jacaria Florida, Inc., Confecciones Lord S.A., Moises Saieh, Kathya Saieh. EOD: 5/13/13; USCA number: 13-11959-A. (JNB)
May 13, 2013 Filing 813 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John E. Bergendahl on behalf of Luis Sutherlin (Bergendahl, John)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 812 ORDER ATTACHED regarding "(Statistical) Judgments" in this case. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/13/2013. (CCB)
May 13, 2013 Filing 811 REPLY to Response to Motion re #750 MOTION to Strike #709 Response to motion filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dotterrer, John)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER denying #806 Claimant's Motion for Stay of the Court's Turnover Judgment Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/13/2013. (SKH)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER denying #803 Claimant's Motion to Alter Judgment and for New Trial. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/13/2013. (SKH)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER ATTACHED denying #649 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Entry of TRIA Turnover Judgment on Garnishee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Answer. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/13/2013. (SKH)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 807 ENDORSED ORDER denying #805 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/13/2013. (SKH)
May 13, 2013 Filing 806 Third Party MOTION to stay re #791 Judgment, #780 Order on motion for judgment by Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Sandra Saieh. (Klugh, Richard)
May 13, 2013 Filing 805 Third Party MOTION for leave to file Leave to Reply to Plaintiffs' Response DE 804 by Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Sandra Saieh. (Klugh, Richard)
May 13, 2013 Filing 804 RESPONSE in Opposition re #803 Third Party MOTION to Alter Judgment Third Party MOTION to Amend/Correct #791 Judgment, #780 Order on motion for judgment Third Party MOTION for New Trial and to Strike Affidavits as Untimely filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
May 10, 2013 Filing 803 Third Party MOTION to Alter Judgment , Third Party MOTION to Amend/Correct #791 Judgment, #780 Order on motion for judgment , Third Party MOTION for New Trial by Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Sandra Saieh. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Affidavit of Carlos Saieh, #2 Appendix B - Affidavit of ICE Special Agent Romedio Viola)(Klugh, Richard)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 802 ORDER ATTACHED denying #801 Motion to Stay re: #764 Judgment, #763 Judgment, #765 Judgment, #762 Judgment, #766 Judgment Pending Appeal by Armando Jaar, Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh, Carmen Siman. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/10/2013. (DMB)
May 10, 2013 Filing 801 Third Party MOTION to stay re #764 Judgment, #763 Judgment, #765 Judgment, #762 Judgment, #766 Judgment by Armando Jaar, Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh, Carmen Siman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Affidavit, #2 Appendix B - Affidavit)(Klugh, Richard)
May 9, 2013 Filing 800 JUDGMENT in favor of Garnishee Banco Santander International against Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes as to the Plaintiffs' Writs of Execution/Garnishment (Dkts. 411 & 412). (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RFK)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #703 the Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment in light of the Court's earlier Order #798 granting Garnishee BSI's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/9/2013. (DMB)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 798 ORDER ATTACHED granting #661 Garnishee Banco Santander International's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and directing the Clerk to enter Judgment in Garnishee BSI's favor as to #411 #412 the Plaintiffs' Writs of Execution/Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/9/2013. (DMB)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 797 ORDER of USCA: Motion to stay lower court proceedings filed by Appellant ALM Investment Florida, Inc., we GRANT A TEMPORARY STAY of the garnishment at issue here, effective until the close of business on Tuesday, May 14, 2013 as to #731 Notice of appeal filed by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., Miriam Sutherlin, Sandra Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Ricardo Jaar, MLA Investments Inc., Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Overseas, Inc., Carmen Siman, Armando Jaar, C.W. Salman Partners, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc., Salman Coral Way Partners, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Laura Saieh, Abdala Saieh, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Jacaria Florida, Inc., Confecciones Lord S.A., Moises Saieh, Kathya Saieh. EOD: 5/8/13; USCA number: 13-11959-A. (JNB)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ORDER ATTACHED denying #787 Third Party Claimant Brunello Ltd.'s Motion for Stay of Execution and Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/8/2013. (DMB)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 795 AMENDED ORDER granting #668 Unopposed Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/8/2013. (SKH)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 794 AMENDED ORDER granting #664 Unopposed Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/8/2013. (SKH)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 793 AMENDED ORDER granting #662 Unopposed Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/8/2013. (SKH)
May 7, 2013 Filing 787 MOTION to stay re #780 Order on motion for judgment pending appeal and request for oral argument by Brunello, Ltd.. (Kehoe, Gregory)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 785 ENDORSED ORDER granting #782 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct #776 Order on Motion for Judgment, #777 Order on Motion for Judgment, #778 Order on Motion for Judgment (due to scrivener's error in paragraph 20 of each) by all Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/7/2013.(DMB)
May 6, 2013 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #773 Notice of appeal. (BSN)
May 6, 2013 Filing 792 JUDGMENT in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against Oppenheimer & Co. Inc. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (BSN)
May 6, 2013 Filing 791 VACATED PER #898 ORDER (Statistical)JUDGMENT in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc. as to Brunello, LTD. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (BSN) Modified on 1/27/2015 (BSN).
May 6, 2013 Filing 790 (Statistical) JUDGMENT on answer to writ of garnishment in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. as to C.I. Otilia Flowers, S.A. (BSN)
May 6, 2013 Filing 789 (Statistical) JUDGMENT on answer to writ of garnishment in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. as to Obursatiles, S.A. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (BSN)
May 6, 2013 Filing 788 (Statistical) JUDGMENT on answer to writ of garnishment in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. as to Phanor Arizabaleta (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (BSN)
May 6, 2013 Filing 786 (Statistical) JUDGMENT on answer to writ of garnishment in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. as to Operaciones Bursatiles S.A. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (BSN) REPLACED IMAGE WITH CORRECTED JUDGMENT. Modified on 5/7/2013 (BSN).
May 6, 2013 Filing 784 RESPONSE in Opposition re #703 MOTION for summary judgment against Garnishee Banco Santander International on TRIA Writs DE 411-412 pursuant to DE 702 filed by Banco Santander International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Green, Michael)
May 6, 2013 Filing 783 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brandon Green on behalf of Banco Santander International (Green, Michael)
May 6, 2013 Filing 782 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #776 Order on motion for judgment, #777 Order on motion for judgment, #778 Order on motion for judgment [due to scrivener's error in paragraph 20 of each by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Korvick, Tony)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 781 ORDER granting #712 Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/6/2013. (SKH)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 780 VACATED PER #898 ORDER ORDER granting #701 Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/6/2013. (SKH) Modified on 1/27/2015 (BSN).
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 779 ORDER granting #700 Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/6/2013. (SKH)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER granting #668 Unopposed Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/6/2013. (SKH)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER granting #664 Unopposed Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/6/2013. (SKH)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 776 ORDER granting #662 Unopposed Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/6/2013. (SKH)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ORDER ATTACHED denying for lack of jurisdiction #772 Motion to Alter Judgment and Motion for New Trial; and denying for lack of jurisdiction #774 Motion to Alter Judgment and Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/6/2013. (CCB)
May 6, 2013 Filing 774 Amended MOTION to Alter Judgment , Amended MOTION for New Trial by Armando Jaar, Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh, Carmen Siman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Death cetificate for Abdala Saieh, #2 Appendix B - Judgment Exonerating Carlos Saieh, #3 Appendix C - OFAC Letter Regarding Administrative Reconsideration)(Klugh, Richard)
May 6, 2013 Filing 773 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #764 Judgment, #755 Order on motion for judgment, #763 Judgment, #396 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #327 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #765 Judgment, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #757 Order on motion for judgment, #622 Order, #759 Order on motion for judgment, #635 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #756 Order on motion for judgment, #539 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #762 Judgment, #758 Order on motion for judgment, #766 Judgment, #459 Order on Motion to QuashOrder on motion for judgmentOrder on Motion to Vacate by Armando Jaar, Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh, Carmen Siman. Filing fee not paid. (Klugh, Richard)
May 6, 2013 Filing 772 Third Party MOTION to Alter Judgment , Third Party MOTION for New Trial by Armando Jaar, Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh, Carmen Siman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Abdala Saieh death certificate, #2 Appendix B - Carlos Saieh Exoneration Order, #3 Appendix C- OFAC administrative reconsideration)(Klugh, Richard)
May 6, 2013 Filing 771 RESPONSE in Opposition re #701 MOTION for JUdgment on Garnishee Merrill Lynch Answer DE 613 to Writs DE 403 (amended nunc pro tunc at DE 582-1, DE 635, as per Orders DE 578 and DE 622) judgment filed by Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Sandra Saieh. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Affidavit of Jacqueline Saieh, #2 Appendix B - Final Judgment of Dismissal as to Carlos Saieh, #3 Appendix C - OFAC Administrative Action Letter, #4 Appendix D - OFAC Letter Advising of Delisting)(Klugh, Richard)
May 3, 2013 Filing 770 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #664 Unopposed MOTION for on Answer to TRIA Writ of Garnishment judgment Unopposed Motion for Entry of Judgment JPMCB Answer DE 486, #668 Unopposed MOTION for on Answer DE 485 to TRIA Writ judgment Unopposed Motion for Entry of Judgment JPMCB Answer DE 485, #662 Unopposed MOTION for On Answer to TRIA Writ Garnishment judgment Unopposed Motion for Entry of Judgment JPMCB Answer DE 484, #701 MOTION for JUdgment on Garnishee Merrill Lynch Answer DE 613 to Writs DE 403 (amended nunc pro tunc at DE 582-1, DE 635, as per Orders DE 578 and DE 622) judgment of Filing Substitute Proposed TRIA Turnover Judgments (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Substitute proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment replacing DE 662-1 (JPMCB), #2 Exhibit 2. Substitute proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment replacing DE 664-1 (JPMCB), #3 Exhibit 3. Substitute proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment replacing DE 668-1 (JPMCB), #4 Exhibit 4. Substitute proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment replacing DE 701-1 (MLPFS))(Korvick, Tony)
May 3, 2013 Filing 769 REPLY to Response to Motion re #701 MOTION for JUdgment on Garnishee Merrill Lynch Answer DE 613 to Writs DE 403 (amended nunc pro tunc at DE 582-1, DE 635, as per Orders DE 578 and DE 622) judgment filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
May 2, 2013 Filing 768 (Statistical) JUDGMENT on answer to writ of garnishment in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against Bank of America, N.A. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RFK)
May 2, 2013 Filing 767 (Statistical) JUDGMENT on answer to writ of garnishment in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against Bank of America, N.A. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RFK)
May 2, 2013 Filing 766 (Statistical) JUDGMENT on answer to writ of garnishment in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against Bank of America, N.A. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RFK)
May 2, 2013 Filing 765 (Statistical) JUDGMENT on answer to writ of garnishment in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against Bank of America, N.A. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RFK)
May 2, 2013 Filing 764 (Statistical) JUDGMENT on answer to writ of garnishment in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against UBS AG (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RFK)
May 2, 2013 Filing 763 (Statistical) JUDGMENT on answer to writ of garnishment in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against HSBC Bank, USA (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RFK)
May 2, 2013 Filing 762 (Statistical) JUDGMENT on answer to writ of garnishment in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against HSBC Bank, USA (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RFK)
May 2, 2013 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #738 Notice of appeal. (BSN)
May 2, 2013 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number tpa17157 re #738 Notice of appeal filed by Plainview Florida II, Inc., C.W. Salman Partners, Salman Coral Way Partners (ARC)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ORDER granting #681 Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/2/2013. (SKH)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER granting #680 Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/2/2013. (SKH)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 759 ORDER granting #679 Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/2/2013. (SKH)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER granting #678 Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/2/2013. (SKH)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER granting #677 Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/2/2013. (SKH)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER granting #674 Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/2/2013. (SKH)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER granting #670 Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. (Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment attached.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/2/2013. (SKH)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ENDORSED ORDER that Plaintiffs are directed to file a reply, on or before Tuesday, May 7, 2013, to #752 Claimant Brunello Ltd.'s Response to #701 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of TRIA Turnover Judgment on #613 Garnishee Merrill Lynch Answer. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 5/2/2013. (DMB)
May 1, 2013 Filing 753 NOTICE by Brunello, Ltd. re #752 Response to motion of filing supplemental exhibits in support of response to motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-3 - Articles of Incorporation, #2 Exhibit C-4 - Letter, #3 Exhibit D - Amicus Brief)(Kehoe, Gregory)
May 1, 2013 Filing 752 RESPONSE to Motion re #701 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee Merrill Lynch Answer DE 613 to Writs DE 403 (amended nunc pro tunc at DE 582-1, DE 635, as per Orders DE 578 and DE 622) judgment filed by Brunello, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Weiner affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Saieh Passport, #3 Exhibit C - Price affidavit, #4 Exhibit C-1 - Trust Deed, #5 Exhibit C-2 - Nominee Declaration)(Kehoe, Gregory)
April 30, 2013 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Joseph W. Ozmer, II, appearing on behalf of Plainview Florida II, Inc. (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA17104) Related document: #642 MOTION for Joseph W. Ozmer II to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ENDORSED ORDER denying #750 Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Strike #709 Response by HS Ad, Inc., but granting Wells Fargo leave to file a reply to the response. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/30/2013. (DMB)
April 30, 2013 Filing 750 MOTION to Strike #709 Response to motion by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dotterrer, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #748 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/30/2013. (DMB)
April 30, 2013 Filing 748 Third Party MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Stay by Jamce Investments, Ltd., Jaime Saieh, Moises Saieh, Miriam Sutherlin. (Klugh, Richard)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER ATTACHED denying #737 Third Party Claimants' Jamce Investments, Ltd., Jacqueline Saieh, Miriam Sutherlin, Jaime Saieh and Moises Saieh's Motion for Stay of the Court's Turnover Judgment Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/30/2013. (DMB)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ENDORSED ORDER that #744 the Court's Judgment on #649 Plaintiffs' Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case was entered in error and is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/30/2013. (DMB)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 745 ORDER granting #675 Unopposed Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. Turnover judgment on answer to writ of garnishment in a civil case attached. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/30/2013. (SKH) Modified on 4/30/2013 (DMB).
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 744 ORDER granting #649 Motion for Turnover Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/30/2013. (SKH) VACATED AT DKT. 746. Modified on 4/30/2013 (DMB).
April 30, 2013 Filing 743 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #678 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 490 judgment , #679 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 487 judgment , #670 MOTION for for Entry of Judgment on Garnishee HSBC Answer DE 505 judgment , #674 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee HSBC Answer DE 504 to Writ DE 370 judgment , #680 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 488 judgment , #677 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee UBS Answer DE 447 judgment , #681 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 491 judgment of Filing Proposed Substitute TRIA Turnover Judgments (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Korvick, Tony)
April 29, 2013 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #738 Notice of appeal. (BSN)
April 29, 2013 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #736 Notice of appeal by W. Salman Partners, Confecciones Lord S.A., Armando Jaar, Ricardo Jaar, Jacaria Florida, Inc., Jamc e Investments, Ltd., Karen Overseas, Inc., MLA Investments Inc., Abdala Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners, Carmen Siman, Sunset & 97th Hol dings, LLC, Miriam Sutherlin, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc, re #736 Notice of appeal.. (BSN)
April 29, 2013 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #736 Notice of appeal by W. Salman Partners, Confecciones Lord S.A., Armando Jaar, Ricardo Jaar, Jacaria Florida, Inc., Jamc e Investments, Ltd., Karen Overseas, Inc., MLA Investments Inc., Abdala Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners, Carmen Siman, Sunset & 97th Hol dings, LLC, Miriam Sutherlin, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc, re #736 Notice of appeal. (BSN)
April 29, 2013 Filing 742 RESPONSE in Opposition re #737 Third Party MOTION to stay re #725 Order on motion for judgment Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion for Stay of TRIA Judgment DE 725 Jamce filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CM/ECF.Notice.Filing.DE 650)(Porter, Newton)
April 29, 2013 Filing 741 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment DE 625 by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Dennis)
April 29, 2013 Filing 740 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment DE 625 by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Dennis)
April 29, 2013 Filing 739 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Campbell, Dennis)
April 29, 2013 Filing 738 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #711 Order by C.W. Salman Partners, Plainview Florida II, Inc., Salman Coral Way Partners. Filing fee not paid. (Ferro, Simon)
April 29, 2013 Filing 737 Third Party MOTION to stay re #725 Order on motion for judgment by Jamce Investments, Ltd., Jaime Saieh, Moises Saieh, Miriam Sutherlin. (Klugh, Richard)
April 29, 2013 Filing 736 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to re #732 Order on Motion to Alter JudgmentOrder on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for New Trial, re #735 Order, C.W. Salman Partners, Confecciones Lord S.A., Armando Jaar, Ricardo Jaar, Jacaria Florida, Inc., Jamce Investments, Ltd., Karen Overseas, Inc., MLA Investments Inc., Abdala Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners, Carmen Siman, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Miriam Sutherlin, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc. (Klugh, Richard)THIS IS A new appeal only for new documents filed re: #735 and #732 after first notice of appeal filed. Filing fee not paid for this appeal. Modified on 5/1/2013 (BSN). Modified on 5/8/2013 (BSN).
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 735 ORDER ATTACHED denying #551 Third Party Claimants Jacqueline Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Laura Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Granada Associates, Inc., and Moises Saieh's Emergency Motion to Stay Sale of Property, Based on Innocent Owner Status, and to Set Aside Writs of Execution.Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/29/2013. (DMB)
April 26, 2013 Filing 734 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #709 Response to motion requesting immunity by Wells Fargo filed by HS AD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Comras, David)
April 26, 2013 Filing 733 NOTICE by Jamce Investments, Ltd., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Miriam Sutherlin re #732 Order on Motion to Alter JudgmentOrder on Motion to Amend/CorrectOrder on Motion for New Trial Concerning Non-Receipt of Electronic Mailing of Docket Entries 649, 650, & 651 (Klugh, Richard)
April 26, 2013 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, ifapplicable to USCA re #731 Amended Notice of appeal, #728 Notice of appeal. (BSN)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORDER ATTACHED denying #730 Third Party Claimants Jamce Investments, Ltd., Jacqueline Saieh, Miriam Sutherlin, Sandra Saieh, Laura Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Amelia Saieh, Carlos Saieh, and Moises Saieh's Motion to Alter Judgment Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/26/2013. (DMB)
April 26, 2013 Filing 731 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #323 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #415 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #672 Order, #727 Judgment, #725 Order on motion for judgment, #322 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, #726 Order, #458 Judgment, #695 Order by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., C.W. Salman Partners, Confecciones Lord S.A., Armando Jaar, Ricardo Jaar, Jacaria Florida, Inc., Karen Overseas, Inc., MLA Investments Inc., Abdala Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners, Carmen Siman, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Miriam Sutherlin, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc.. Filing fee not paid. (Klugh, Richard) Modified on 4/26/2013 (BSN).
April 25, 2013 Filing 730 Third Party MOTION to Alter Judgment , Third Party MOTION to Amend/Correct #725 Order on motion for judgment , Third Party MOTION for New Trial by Jamce Investments, Ltd., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Miriam Sutherlin. (Klugh, Richard)
April 25, 2013 Filing 729 REPLY to Response to Motion re #649 Amended MOTION for Entry of Judgment on Garnishee Wells Fargo Answer DE 433 judgment filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Federal Register publication, #2 Exhibit 2. HS Ad - website Company Overview, #3 Exhibit 3. HS Ad - website Global Network, #4 Exhibit 4. Hausler I decision Judge Marrero, #5 Exhibit 5. Hausler II decision Judge Marrero, #6 Exhibit 6. Levin decision Judge Patterson, #7 Exhibit 7. Brief of Appellee Hausler, #8 Exhibit 8. Brief of Appellant Calderon-Cardona, #9 Exhibit 9. Reply Brief of Appellan Calderon-Cardona, #10 Exhibit 10. Brief of Iranian Judgment Credtors' Amici in Calderon-Cardona, #11 Exhibit 11. Brief of Appellants in Heiser, #12 Exhibit 12. Reply Brief of Appellants in Heiser)(Korvick, Tony)
April 25, 2013 Filing 728 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #727 Judgment, #725 Order on motion for judgment by Jamce Investments, Ltd., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Miriam Sutherlin. Filing fee not paid. (Klugh, Richard)
April 25, 2013 Filing 727 (Statistical) JUDGMENT on answer to writ of garnishment in favor of Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (BSN)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER ATTACHED denying #558 Third Party Claimants Salman Coral Way Partners, C.W. Salman Partners, Confecciones Lord S.A., ALM Investments Florida, Inc., Granada Associates, Inc., Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc., Karen Overseas, Inc., MLA Investments Inc., Jacaria Florida, Inc., and Sunset & 97th's Motion to Dissolve Writs of Garnishment and Execution. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/25/2013. (DMB)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER granting #650 Unopposed Motion for judgment. Turnover judgment on answer to writ of garnishment in a civil case. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/25/2013. (see order) (MSS)
April 24, 2013 Filing 724 MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE to Motion re #681 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 491 judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis) Modified on 4/25/2013 (BSN).
April 24, 2013 Filing 723 MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE to Motion re #680 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 488 judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis) Modified on 4/25/2013 (BSN).
April 24, 2013 Filing 722 Memorandum in Response to Motion re #679 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 487 judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis) Modified on 4/25/2013 (BSN).
April 23, 2013 Filing 721 RESPONSE to Motion re #678 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 490 judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ENDORSED ORDER granting #719 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct #703 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Paragraph 15 by interlineation. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/23/2013. (DMB)
April 23, 2013 Filing 719 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #703 MOTION for summary judgment against Garnishee Banco Santander International on TRIA Writs DE 411-412 pursuant to DE 702 to Amend Paragraph 15 of DE 703 by Interlineation by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
April 23, 2013 Filing 718 RESPONSE in Opposition re #701 MOTION for JUdgment on Garnishee Merrill Lynch Answer DE 613 to Writs DE 403 (amended nunc pro tunc at DE 582-1, DE 635, as per Orders DE 578 and DE 622) judgment filed by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Dennis)
April 23, 2013 Filing 717 RESPONSE to Motion re #677 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee UBS Answer DE 447 judgment filed by UBS AG. (Campbell, Dennis)
April 23, 2013 Filing 716 NOTICE to counsel Joseph W. Ozmer, II of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (BSN)
April 22, 2013 Filing 715 REPLY to Response to Motion re #661 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings and Alternative MOTION for summary judgment filed by Banco Santander International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Losego, Clinton)
April 19, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 676 Order on Motion for Leave to File. Regenerated NEF to Joseph W. Ozmer, II. (JNB)
April 19, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 666 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice. Regenerated NEF to Joseph W. Ozmer, II. (JNB)
April 19, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: #658 Order on Motion to Intervene. Regenerated NEF to Joseph W. Ozmer, II. (JNB)
April 19, 2013 Filing 714 REPLY to Response to Motion re #551 Emergency MOTION to stay Marshal's Sale re #439 Writ issued, #543 US Marshal 285 form, #438 Writ issued, #421 Order on motion for writ of executionThird Party MOTION to vacate #439 Writ issued, #543 US Marshal 285 form, #438 Writ issued, #421 Order on motion for writ of execution, #558 Third Party MOTION to stay Determination of Motion to Dissolve, Set Aside, and Obtain Relief from Judgment of Garnishment and ExecutionThird Party MOTION to alter judgmentThird Party MOTION for relief from judgment of garnishment filed by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., C.W. Salman Partners, Confecciones Lord S.A., Jacaria Florida, Inc., Karen Overseas, Inc., MLA Investments Inc., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Miriam Sutherlin, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Reply)(Klugh, Richard)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 713 ENDORSED ORDER that Third Party Claimant HS Ad., Inc. South Korea's Motion to Intervene is granted. Plaintiffs are directed to file a reply on or before Friday, 4/26/13, to HS Ad., Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of TRIA Turnover Judgment on Garnishee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Dkt. 649)and Notice of Claim. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/19/2013. (DMB)
April 19, 2013 Filing 712 Unopposed MOTION for TRIA Turnover Judgment on Garnishee Oppenheimer Answer DE 705 judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment)(Korvick, Tony)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 711 ORDER ATTACHED denying #550 Third Party Claimants Plainview Florida II, Inc., C.W. Salman Partners, and Salman Coral Way Partners' Emergency Motion to Vacate or Modify Orders and to Dissolve Writs of Execution/Garnishment or, Alternatively, to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/19/2013. (DMB)
April 18, 2013 Filing 710 RESPONSE to Motion re #650 Amended MOTION for Entry of Judgment on Garnishee Wells Fargo Answer DE 435 judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dotterrer, John)
April 18, 2013 Filing 709 RESPONSE to Motion re #649 Amended MOTION for Entry of Judgment on Garnishee Wells Fargo Answer DE 433 judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dotterrer, John)
April 18, 2013 Filing 708 RESPONSE in Opposition re #649 Amended MOTION for Entry of Judgment on Garnishee Wells Fargo Answer DE 433 judgment , Motion to Intervene and Notice of Claim by HS Ad filed by HS AD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Comras, David) Modified on 4/22/2013 (BSN).
April 18, 2013 Filing 707 APPEARANCE of non-resident counsel and designation of local counsel by David A. Comras on behalf of HS AD, Inc.. Local Counsel: David Comras. Non-Resident Counsel: Hal Eren. (Comras, David)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ENDORSED ORDER granting #704 Motion for Leave to File a Reply by Banco Santander International. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/18/2013. (DMB)
April 18, 2013 Filing 705 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.. (Zadanosky, Cory)
April 18, 2013 Filing 704 MOTION for leave to file Reply by Banco Santander International. (Losego, Clinton)
April 17, 2013 Filing 703 MOTION for summary judgment against Garnishee Banco Santander International on TRIA Writs DE 411-412 pursuant to DE 702 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. proposed TRIA Summary Judgment)(Korvick, Tony)
April 17, 2013 Filing 702 RESPONSE in Opposition re #661 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings and Alternative MOTION for summary judgment filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Korvick, Tony)
April 17, 2013 Filing 701 MOTION for JUdgment on Garnishee Merrill Lynch Answer DE 613 to Writs DE 403 (amended nunc pro tunc at DE 582-1, DE 635, as per Orders DE 578 and DE 622) judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment)(Korvick, Tony)
April 16, 2013 Filing 700 Unopposed MOTION for TRIA Judgment on Answer Writ Garnishment DE699 judgment Agreed Motion for Entry TRIA Judgment on JGB Bank Answer DE 699 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Judgment JGB Bank Answer DE 699 Writ DE 628)(Porter, Newton)
April 15, 2013 Filing 699 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by JGB Bank, N.A.. (Brown, Andrew)
April 15, 2013 Filing 698 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry R. Weiss on behalf of Brunello, Ltd. (Weiss, Terry)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 697 ORDER of USCA: Appellant's motion to transfer consideration of the issue of appellate attorney's fees to the district court is GRANTED as to #276 Notice of appeal filed by Mercurio International S.A., #284 Notice of appeal filed by Mercurio International S.A.. EOD: 4/15/13; USCA number: 11-11125-CC, 11-11690-CC. (JNB)
April 12, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: #643 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice. "Return to sender; not deliverable as addressed; unable to forward" as to Joseph W. Ozmer, II. (JNB)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 696 AMENDED ENDORSED ORDER granting #673 Amended Joint Motion for Leave to File a Joint Reply to Plaintiffs' Responses (Dkts. 646 & 647) to Motions to Dissolve Writs (Dkts. 551 & 558). The Joint Reply shall be filed on or before Friday, April 19, 2013. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/12/2013.(DMB)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER ATTACHED denying #523 Claimants Carmen Siman de Jaar, Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh, and Abdala Saieh's Motion to Dissolve Writs of Garnishment, Motion to Set Aside Ex Parte Orders Granting Writs of Execution, Request for Evidentiary Hearing, and Motion to Continue Stay of all Proceedings Relating to Previously Issued Writs of Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/12/2013. (DMB)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 694 ENDORSED ORDER denying #693 Motion for Reconsideration re 637 Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply by Plainview Florida II, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/12/2013.(DMB)
April 11, 2013 Filing 693 MOTION for Reconsideration re 637 Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply by Plainview Florida II, Inc.. (Ferro, Simon)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #689 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/11/2013. (DMB)
April 11, 2013 Filing 691 NOTICE by Banco Santander International re #661 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings and Alternative MOTION for summary judgment Responses and Objections to Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Losego, Clinton)
April 11, 2013 Filing 690 NOTICE of supplemental authority in Support of Emergency Motion to Vacate Order and Quash Writs of Garnishment and Execution (Doc. 550) by Plainview Florida II, Inc. (Ferro, Simon)
April 11, 2013 Filing 689 MOTION for Reconsideration re 637 Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply by Plainview Florida II, Inc.. (Ferro, Simon)
April 10, 2013 Filing 688 RESPONSE in Opposition re #674 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee HSBC Answer DE 504 to Writ DE 370 judgment filed by Moises Saieh. (Klugh, Richard)
April 10, 2013 Filing 687 RESPONSE in Opposition re #677 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee UBS Answer DE 447 judgment filed by Carmen Siman. (Klugh, Richard)
April 10, 2013 Filing 686 RESPONSE in Opposition re #678 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 490 judgment , #679 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 487 judgment filed by Armando Jaar, Carmen Siman. (Klugh, Richard)
April 10, 2013 Filing 685 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #424 Writ Issued Withdrawal and Dismissal of Writ Garnishment DE 424 to Banco do Brasil, S.A. (Korvick, Tony)
April 10, 2013 Filing 684 US Marshal 285 form for service April 8, 2013 Writ DE 628 on JGB Bank, NA. (Korvick, Tony)
April 10, 2013 Filing 683 US Marshal 285 form for April 8, 2013 service Writ DE 625 on MLPFS (Amended Writ DE 403 relating back nunc pro tunc as per Order DE 622. (Korvick, Tony)
April 10, 2013 Filing 682 US Marshal 285 form for April 8, 2013 service Writ DE 424 on Banco do Brasil, SA. (Korvick, Tony) Modified date on 4/10/2013 (RFK).
April 10, 2013 Filing 681 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 491 judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment)(Korvick, Tony)
April 10, 2013 Filing 680 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 488 judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment)(Korvick, Tony)
April 10, 2013 Filing 679 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 487 judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment)(Korvick, Tony)
April 10, 2013 Filing 678 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee BOA Answer DE 490 judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment)(Korvick, Tony)
April 10, 2013 Filing 677 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee UBS Answer DE 447 judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment)(Korvick, Tony)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ENDORSED ORDER granting #673 Amended Joint Motion for Leave to File a Joint Reply to Plaintiffs' Responses (Dkts. 646 & 647) to Motions to Dissolve Writs (Dkts. 551 & 558). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/10/2013. (DMB)
April 10, 2013 Filing 675 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee HSBC Answer DE 506 to Writ DE 372 judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment)(Korvick, Tony)
April 10, 2013 Filing 674 MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee HSBC Answer DE 504 to Writ DE 370 judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment)(Korvick, Tony)
April 10, 2013 Filing 673 Amended MOTION for leave to file Reply by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., C.W. Salman Partners, Confecciones Lord S.A., Jacaria Florida, Inc., Karen Overseas, Inc., MLA Investments Inc., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Miriam Sutherlin. (Klugh, Richard)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 672 ORDER ATTACHED denying #482 Claimants Carmen Siman de Jaar, Armando Jaar, Ricardo Jaar, Carlos Saieh, and Moises Saieh's Motion to Dissolve Writs of Garnishment, Motion to Set Aside Ex Parte Orders Granting Writs of Execution and Discharge, Request for Evidentiary Hearing, and Motion to Stay Execution of, and to Alter, Amend, and Obtain Relief From Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/9/2013. (DMB)
April 9, 2013 Filing 671 RESPONSE in Opposition re #670 MOTION for for Entry of Judgment on Garnishee HSBC Answer DE 505 judgment filed by Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh. (Klugh, Richard)
April 9, 2013 Filing 670 MOTION for for Entry of Judgment on Garnishee HSBC Answer DE 505 judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment)(Korvick, Tony)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #663 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion For Entry of TRIA Turnover Judgment on Garnishee JP Morgan Chase Bank. N.A.'s Answer #484 in light of Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal #667. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/9/2013. (DMB)
April 9, 2013 Filing 668 Unopposed MOTION for on Answer DE 485 to TRIA Writ judgment Unopposed Motion for Entry of Judgment JPMCB Answer DE 485 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Judgment DE 485)(Porter, Newton)
April 9, 2013 Filing 667 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #663 Unopposed MOTION for On Answer to TRIA Writ of Garnishment judgment Unopposed Motion for Entry of Judgment JPMCB Answer DE 485 filed by Keith Stansell, Greer C. Janis, Marc Gonsalves, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis Notice of Withdrawal of DE 663 and 663-1 Due to Scrivener's Error (Porter, Newton)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ENDORSED ORDER granting #665 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/9/2013. (DMB)
April 9, 2013 Filing 665 Unopposed MOTION for Hal Eren to appear pro hac vice by HS AD, Inc.. (Comras, David)
April 9, 2013 Filing 664 Unopposed MOTION for on Answer to TRIA Writ of Garnishment judgment Unopposed Motion for Entry of Judgment JPMCB Answer DE 486 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Judgment DE 486)(Porter, Newton)
April 9, 2013 Filing 663 Unopposed MOTION for On Answer to TRIA Writ of Garnishment judgment Unopposed Motion for Entry of Judgment JPMCB Answer DE 485 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Judgment DE 485)(Porter, Newton)
April 9, 2013 Filing 662 Unopposed MOTION for On Answer to TRIA Writ Garnishment judgment Unopposed Motion for Entry of Judgment JPMCB Answer DE 484 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Judgment)(Porter, Newton)
April 8, 2013 Filing 661 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings and Alternative, MOTION for summary judgment by Banco Santander International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Losego, Clinton)
April 8, 2013 Filing 660 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera re #640 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 13-11339. (Strafer, Guy)
April 8, 2013 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Hal Eren, appearing on behalf of HS AD, Inc. (Filing fee $10 receipt number TPA16653.). (JNB)
April 8, 2013 Filing 659 NOTICE of compliance re #653 Order on Motion for Sanctions by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER ATTACHED denying #657 HS AD, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene Pursuant to FRCP 24(a). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/8/2013. (DMB)
April 8, 2013 Filing 657 MOTION to intervene by HS AD, Inc.. (Comras, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ENDORSED ORDER that upon due consideration, it is ordered and adjudged that the nineteen-page Motion for Leave to Reply #654 is denied because, in reality, the motion itself is a reply which was filed without leave of Court as required by Local Rule 3.01(c). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/8/2013. (DMB)
April 7, 2013 Filing 655 NOTICE by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., C.W. Salman Partners, Confecciones Lord S.A., Jacaria Florida, Inc., Karen Overseas, Inc., MLA Investments Inc., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC re #654 Third Party MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Responses Motions to Dissolve Writs of Garnishment of Filing Administrative Action Letter (Klugh, Richard)
April 7, 2013 Filing 654 Third Party MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Responses Motions to Dissolve Writs of Garnishment by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., C.W. Salman Partners, Confecciones Lord S.A., Granada Associates, Inc., Jacaria Florida, Inc., Karen Overseas, Inc., MLA Investments Inc., Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc.. (Klugh, Richard)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER ATTACHED directing Plaintiffs to pay directly to counsel for Claimant Plainview Florida II, Inc., the sum of $36,076.48, as a refund in full for the funds garnished from Terrabank, N.A. under #355 the Court's writ of garnishment; denying #626 Claimant Plainview Florida, II, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions; and denying as moot #550 the Emergency Motion to Vacate or Modify Orders and to Dissolve Writs of Execution/Garnishment or, Alternatively, to Stay to the extent that it pertains to Claimant Plainview Florida II, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/5/2013.(DMB)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER granting #631 Motion to Enforce Judgment and ORDER to immediately release funds to claimant Mercurio. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/5/2013. (MSS)
April 4, 2013 Filing 651 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dotterrer, John)
April 4, 2013 Filing 650 Amended MOTION for Entry of Judgment on Garnishee Wells Fargo Answer DE 435 judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment)(Korvick, Tony)
April 4, 2013 Filing 649 Amended MOTION for Entry of Judgment on Garnishee Wells Fargo Answer DE 433 judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. proposed TRIA Turnover Judgment)(Korvick, Tony)
April 4, 2013 Filing 648 US Marshal 285 form for Writ DE 357 on UBS AG on 9/23/11. (Korvick, Tony)
April 4, 2013 Filing 647 RESPONSE in Opposition re #558 Third Party MOTION to stay Determination of Motion to Dissolve, Set Aside, and Obtain Relief from Judgment of Garnishment and ExecutionThird Party MOTION to alter judgmentThird Party MOTION for relief from judgment of garnishment Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to DE 558 filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
April 4, 2013 Filing 646 RESPONSE in Opposition re #551 Emergency MOTION to stay Marshal's Sale re #439 Writ issued, #543 US Marshal 285 form, #438 Writ issued, #421 Order on motion for writ of executionThird Party MOTION to vacate #439 Writ issued, #543 US Marshal 285 form, #438 Writ issued, #421 Order on motion for writ of execution Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to DE 551 filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ENDORSED ORDER granting #644 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages to Respond to Third Party Entity Claimants' Motion #558. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/3/2013. (DMB)
April 3, 2013 Filing 644 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Respond to DE 558 (22 pages) by All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Newton)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER granting #642 Joseph W. Ozmer, II's motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/2/2013. (SKH)
April 2, 2013 Filing 642 MOTION for Joseph W. Ozmer II to appear pro hac vice by Plainview Florida II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Ferro, Simon)
April 1, 2013 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding Copy of Apeals filing fee re #640 Notice of appeal (BSN)
March 29, 2013 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number tpa16536 re #640 Notice of appeal filed by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera (ARC) Modified date on 5/2/2013 (JNB).
March 29, 2013 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number tpa16534 re #640 Notice of appeal filed by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera (ARC)
March 28, 2013 Filing 641 RESPONSE re #500 Answer to Writ of Garnishment, #499 Answer to Writ of Garnishment filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - BSI subpoena, #2 Exhibit 2 - BSI Verified Petition in Forfeiture Case, #3 Exhibit 3 - BSI Notice Withdrawal Verified Peitition)(Korvick, Tony)
March 28, 2013 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #640 Notice of appeal. (SAH)
March 27, 2013 Filing 640 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #614 Order on Motion to Vacate by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera. Filing fee not paid. (Strafer, Guy)
March 26, 2013 Filing 639 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W. Kehoe on behalf of Brunello, Ltd. (Kehoe, Gregory)
March 26, 2013 Filing 638 NOTICE of supplemental authority in Support of Emergency Motion to Vacate or Modify Orders and to Dissolve Writs of Execution/Garnishment (Doc. 550) by Plainview Florida II, Inc. (Ferro, Simon)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ENDORSED ORDER denying as unnecessary #636 the Motion for leave to File Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion to Vacate Order and Quash Writs of Garnishment/Execution by Plainview Florida II, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/25/2013. (DMB)
March 25, 2013 Filing 636 MOTION for leave to file Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion to Vacate Order and Quash Writs of Garnishment/Execution by Plainview Florida II, Inc.. (Ferro, Simon)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER ATTACHED granting #576 Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay to Enforce SDNT Writs of Garnishment and SDNT Writ of Execution on Real Property and directing Plaintiffs to file responses, on or before Friday, April 5, 2013, to #551 Third Party Claimants Emergency Motion to Stay Sale of Property, Based on Innocent Owner Status, and to Set Aside Writs of Execution (Dkt. 551) and #558 Third Party Claimants Motion to Dissolve Writs of Garnishment and Execution (Dkt. 558). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/22/2013. (DMB)
March 21, 2013 Filing 634 RESPONSE in Opposition re #550 Emergency MOTION to vacate Orders [DE 323, 421] and to quash resulting writs of garnishment and execution Pursuant to Order DE 624 filed by Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OFAC NVC Charts/Designations)(Korvick, Tony)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ENDORSED ORDER granting #632 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Dkt. 550 by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/21/2013. (DMB)
March 21, 2013 Filing 632 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to DE 550 by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
March 21, 2013 Filing 631 Unopposed MOTION to enforce judgment /11th Circuit Mandate and Release Funds to Mercurio by Mercurio International S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Consent JudgmentSDFL, #2 Exhibit B-OrderAmeding JudgmentSDFL, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order releasing Funds to Mercurio)(Valcourt, Matthew)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ENDORSED ORDER granting #629 Claimant Plainview Florida II, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/20/2013. (DMB)
March 20, 2013 Filing 629 MOTION for leave to file Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions by Plainview Florida II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions)(Ferro, Simon)
March 19, 2013 Filing 628 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against JGB Bank, N.A. in the amount of $309,518,913.10. (SAH)
March 14, 2013 Filing 627 RESPONSE to Motion re #626 MOTION for sanctions , #550 Emergency MOTION to vacate Orders [DE 323, 421] and to quash resulting writs of garnishment and execution Partial Response to Emergency Motion DE 550 Related Only to Writ Garnishment DE 355 and Response to DE 626 Motion for Sanctions filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
March 13, 2013 Filing 626 MOTION for sanctions by Plainview Florida II, Inc.. (Ferro, Simon)
March 13, 2013 Filing 625 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED against Bank of America, N.A.; Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. in the amount of $316,023,121.16. (SAH)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ENDORSED ORDER that Plaintiffs are directed to file a response within 10 days of this order to #550 Third Party Plaintiff Plainview Florida II, Inc., C.W. Salman Partners, and Salman Coral Way Partners' "Emergency Motion to Vacate or Modify Orders and to Dissolve Writs of Execution/Garnishment or, Alternatively, to Stay" (Dkt. 550). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/12/2013. (DMB)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER granting #621 Motion for limited lifting of stay; and granting #621 Motion for Writ of Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/12/2013. (see order) (MSS)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER ATTACHED lifting limited stay on issuance of the Amended Writ of Execution/Garnishment as to Brunello, Ltd., holding that the Court's earlier Order on this matter #578 stands, and directing the Clerk to issue Plaintiffs' proposed "Amended Writ of Execution/Garnishment Dkt. 403 Relating Back Nunc Pro Tunc to Date of Service" [582-1]. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/12/2013. (DMB)
March 8, 2013 Filing 621 MOTION for Limited Lifting of Stay; MOTION for Issuance and Service of TRIA Writ of Garnishment on SDNT Blocked Account by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OFAC Chart, #2 Exhibit OFAC SDN List, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Proposed Writ)(Korvick, Tony). Modified on 03/11/13 to edit text. (AG)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ENDORSED ORDER denying as unnecessary #616 Jacqueline Saieh's Third Party Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Memorandum Opposing Brunello Amended. The Motion itself is a reply and it, along with the attached exhibits, has been taken into consideration by the Court. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/7/2013. (DMB)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ENDORSED ORDER that in view of the Notice of Settlement filed at docket 618, the Motion to Enforce #617 is denied as moot. The Court will await the submission of the parties' agreed order settling this matter. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 3/6/2013. (DMB)
March 5, 2013 Filing 618 NOTICE of settlement of Mercurio's Motion DE 617 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
March 4, 2013 Filing 617 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds held by Band of america, MOTION to enforce judgment 11th Circuit Mandate by Mercurio International S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Enforcing Mandate and releasing funds)(Valcourt, Matthew)
March 1, 2013 Filing 616 Third Party MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Memorandum Opposing Brunello Amended Writ by Jacqueline Saieh. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D)(Klugh, Richard)
February 28, 2013 Filing 615 RESPONSE re #590 Memorandum in opposition Response in Opposition to J. Saieh Memorandum DE 590 filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Porter, Newton)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER ATTACHED denying #573 Claimant Jose Ricuarte Diaz Herrera's Consolidated Motion to Vacate the "Stay," Summarily Grant His Pending Motions, Order Plaintiffs and Their Counsel to Place $2,006,878.84 Into the Registry of the Court and For Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/26/2013. (DMB)
February 25, 2013 Filing 613 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment (Answer to Amended Writ of Garnishment) by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Campbell, Dennis)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ENDORSED ORDER granting #611 Plaintiffs' Motion to extend time to respond to DE 590. Deadline extended to 3/8/2013. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/20/2013. (SKH)
February 20, 2013 Filing 611 MOTION to extend time to March 8, 2013 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to DE 590 by All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Newton)
February 19, 2013 Filing 610 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment (DE 374) by HSBC Bank, USA. (Kaufman, Avi)
February 19, 2013 Filing 609 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment (DE 373) by HSBC Bank, USA. (Kaufman, Avi)
February 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ENDORSED ORDER granting #607 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response by Merrill Lynch as to #582 Amended Writ of Garnishment. Responses due by 2/25/2013. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/18/2013. (SKH)
February 15, 2013 Filing 607 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #582 Notice (Other) Amended Writ of Garnishment by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Campbell, Dennis)
February 15, 2013 Filing 606 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to File Claimant Jose Ricuarte Diaz Herrera's Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Herrera's Consolidated Motions [DE579} by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a, #2 Exhibit 1b, #3 Exhibit 1c, #4 Exhibit 1d)(Rosenbaum, Joseph)
February 15, 2013 Filing 605 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Amended by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Dennis)
February 15, 2013 Filing 604 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Amended by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Dennis)
February 15, 2013 Filing 603 US Marshal 285 form for service on 10-18-11 of SDNT Writ DE 423 pursuant to Order DE 418. (Korvick, Tony)
February 15, 2013 Filing 602 US Marshal 285 form for service SDNTK Writs DE 330, 336, 338, 339 pursuant to Order DE 526. (Korvick, Tony) Modified on 2/19/2013 (CEK).
February 15, 2013 Filing 601 US Marshal 285 form for service SDNTK Writ DE 374 pursuant to Order DE 526. (Korvick, Tony) Modified on 2/19/2013 (CEK).
February 15, 2013 Filing 600 US Marshal 285 form for service SDNTK Writ DE 373 pursuant to Order DE 526. (Korvick, Tony)
February 15, 2013 Filing 599 US Marshal 285 form for service SDNTK Writ DE 373 pursuant to Order DE 526. (Korvick, Tony)
February 15, 2013 Filing 598 US Marshal 285 form for service SDNTK Writ DE 374 pursuant to Order DE 526. (Korvick, Tony)
February 15, 2013 Filing 597 US Marshal 285 form for service of SDNTK Writs DE 363-364-369 pursuant to Order DE 526. (Korvick, Tony)
February 12, 2013 Filing 596 RESPONSE in Opposition re #576 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Lift Stay to Enforce SDNT Writs of Garnishment and Execution filed by ALM Investment Florida, Inc., C.W. Salman Partners, Granada Associates, Inc., Armando Jaar, Ricardo Jaar, Jacaria Florida, Inc., Jamce Investments, Ltd., MLA Investments Inc., Abdala Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Moises Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Salman Coral Way Partners, Carmen Siman, Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC, Miriam Sutherlin, Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Klugh, Richard)
February 12, 2013 Filing 595 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Klugh on behalf of Jamce Investments, Ltd. (Klugh, Richard)
February 12, 2013 Filing 594 RESPONSE in Opposition re #576 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Lift Stay to Enforce SDNT Writs of Garnishment and Execution filed by Plainview Florida II, Inc.. (Ferro, Simon)
February 12, 2013 Filing 593 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Klugh on behalf of Miriam Sutherlin (Klugh, Richard)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER ATTACHED granting #587 Plaintiffs' Motion to Maintain Stay on TRIA SDNTK Writs Served to Protect U.S. National Terrorism Victims' Rights. The stay with regard to served TRIA SDNTK writs shall remain in effect and extended so as to allow Plaintiffs to seek a resolution contemplated by the Mercurio decision on blocked Kingpin property. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/12/2013.(DMB)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER ATTACHED denying #588 Plaintiffs' Motion to Maintain Stay on Served Mercurio Writ and vacating/setting aside #261 order granting Plaintiffs' motion for writ of garnishment with regard to Mercurio Internacional, S.A. and #262 the writ of execution/garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/12/2013. (DMB)
February 11, 2013 Filing 590 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #582 Notice (Other) filed by Jacqueline Saieh. (Klugh, Richard)
February 11, 2013 Filing 589 MANDATE of USCA. REVERSED AND REMANDED as to #276 Notice of appeal filed by Mercurio International S.A., #284 Notice of appeal filed by Mercurio International S.A. Issued as Mandate: 2/8/13 USCA number: 11-11125-CC. (JNB)
February 11, 2013 Filing 588 MOTION to stay re #262 Writ Issued, #261 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment Motion to Maintain Stay on BOA Funds and to Issue Writ Garnishment FARC Proceeds by All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Newton)
February 11, 2013 Filing 587 MOTION to stay Motion to Maintain Stay Kingpin Act Writs by All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Newton)
February 5, 2013 Filing 586 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment concerning OK Coffee International S.A. by Ocean Bank. (Mora, Martha)
February 5, 2013 Filing 585 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment concerning Aero Continente, S.A. by Ocean Bank. (Mora, Martha)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ENDORSED ORDER granting #583 Motion for Leave to Submit Memorandum of Law on Plaintiffs' Proposed Amended Writ of Garnishment in Order to Preserve U.S. Citizen's Due Process Rights and To Preserve Issues Raised But Not Resolve in Mercurio Appeal and Pending Mandate in Mercurio. The memorandum shall be filed within 10 days of this order. Issuance of Plaintiffs' Proposed Amended Writ of Garnishment is stayed pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/1/2013. (DMB)
February 1, 2013 Filing 583 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to File Memorandum of Law Concerning Amended Writ of Garnishment by Jacqueline Saieh. (Klugh, Richard)
February 1, 2013 Filing 582 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #403 Writ Issued, #578 Order on Motion to QuashOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Notice Filing Proposed Amended Writ DE 403 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Writ DE 403)(Porter, Newton)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ENDORSED ORDER that counsel for Claimant Jose Ricuarte Diaz Herrera is directed to file a reply to #579 Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Claimant's Consolidated Motions on or before 2/15/13. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/1/2013. (DMB)
January 31, 2013 Filing 580 NOTICE of Appearance of U.S. Citizen Beneficial Owner of Brunello Ltd. Trust Appearance by Richard C. Klugh on behalf of Jacqueline Saieh (Klugh, Richard)
January 31, 2013 Filing 579 RESPONSE in Opposition re #573 MOTION to Vacate #519 Order to "Stay," Smmarily Grant His Pending Motions, Order Plaintiffs and Their Counsel to Place $2,006,878.84 Into the Registry of the Court and for Attorneys Fees and for Attorneys Fees and Costs filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER ATTACHED denying #567 Claimant Brunello Ltd.'s Motion to Dissolve and Motion to Quash Writ of Garnishment; granting #575 Plaintiffs' Limited Motion to Lift Stay and to Amend SDNT Writ of Garnishment (Dkt. 403); and directing Plaintiffs to file the proposed Amended Writ of Execution/Garnishment with the Court on or before Monday, February 4, 2013. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/31/2013.(DMB)
January 30, 2013 Filing 577 RESPONSE in Opposition re #575 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Lift Stay and Amend SDNT Writ of Garnishment DE 403 Nunc Pro Tunc filed by Brunello, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sanchez, Lilly Ann)
January 29, 2013 Filing 576 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Lift Stay to Enforce SDNT Writs of Garnishment and Execution by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
January 29, 2013 Filing 575 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Lift Stay and Amend SDNT Writ of Garnishment DE 403 Nunc Pro Tunc by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
January 28, 2013 Filing 574 RESPONSE to Motion re #567 MOTION to quash Writ of Garnishment and Motion to Dissolve (Rule 3.01(g) Certification) filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis)
January 25, 2013 Filing 573 MOTION to Vacate #519 Order to "Stay," Summarily Grant His Pending Motions, Order Plaintiffs and Their Counsel to Place $2,006,878.84 Into the Registry of the Court and for Attorneys Fees and for Attorneys Fees and Costs by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera. (Rosenbaum, Joseph) Modified on 1/28/2013 - corrected text (SAH).
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ENDORSED ORDER denying as unnecessary #570 Claimant Brunello Ltd.'s Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/24/2013. (DMB)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER confirming substitution of counsel. The law firm Leis Tein, P.L., is relived as counsel and the law firm Wargo & French, LLP is substituted herein. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/24/2013. (MSS)
January 23, 2013 Filing 570 First MOTION for leave to file Reply by Brunello, Ltd.. (Sanchez, Lilly Ann)
January 23, 2013 Filing 569 RESPONSE in Opposition re #567 MOTION to quash Writ of Garnishment and Motion to Dissolve (Rule 3.01(g) Certification) filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Errata 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Korvick, Tony)
January 23, 2013 Filing 568 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by C.W. Salman Partners, Plainview Florida II, Inc., Salman Coral Way Partners. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferro, Simon)
January 23, 2013 Filing 567 MOTION to quash Writ of Garnishment and Motion to Dissolve (Rule 3.01(g) Certification) by Brunello, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sanchez, Lilly Ann)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER ATTACHED denying without prejudice #565 the Motion to Dissolve and Motion to Quash Writ of Garnishment for failure to comply with the conferral requirements of Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/22/2013. (DMB)
January 22, 2013 Filing 565 MOTION to quash Writ of Garnishment and Motion to Dissolve by Brunello, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sanchez, Lilly Ann)
January 17, 2013 Filing 564 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #367 Writ issued, #368 Writ issued, #338 Writ issued, #336 Writ issued Notice of Withdrawal and Dismissal of Writs of Garnishment (Porter, Newton)
January 10, 2013 Filing 563 OPINION/ORDER of USCA. REVERSED AND REMANDED as to #276 Notice of appeal filed by Mercurio International S.A., #284 Notice of appeal filed by Mercurio International S.A.. EOD: 1/9/13; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 11-11125-CC. (JNB)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER ATTACHED granting #561 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Limited Lifting of Stay. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 1/4/2013.(DMB)
January 4, 2013 Filing 561 MOTION to modify Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Limited Lifting of Stay to Serve 12 Already Ordered and Issued Kingpin Act Writs of Garnishment to Protect U.S. National Terrorism Victims' Rights by All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Newton)
July 6, 2012 Filing 560 NOTICE by USA of Substitution of Counsel (Risner, Scott)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER granting #558 Motion to stay as outlined in the attached order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 4/30/2012. (SKH)
April 30, 2012 Filing 558 Third Party MOTION to stay Determination of Motion to Dissolve, Set Aside, and Obtain Relief from Judgment of Garnishment and Execution, Third Party MOTION to alter judgment, Third Party MOTION for relief from judgment of garnishment by C.W. Salman Partners, Salman Coral Way Partners, Confecciones Lord S.A., ALM Investment Florida, Inc., Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc., Karen Overseas, Inc., MLA Investments Inc., Jacaria Florida, Inc., Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stay Pending Mercurio Appeal)(Klugh, Richard)
March 8, 2012 Filing 557 NOTICE of change of address by Lilly Ann Sanchez (Sanchez, Lilly Ann)
March 8, 2012 Filing 556 NOTICE of change of address by Lilly Ann Sanchez (Sanchez, Lilly Ann)
March 2, 2012 Filing 555 PROOF OF PUBLICATION filed by Ovidio Salinas Perez. Newspaper: Miami Daily Business Review Date(s) of publication 2/1/12;2/8/12;2/15/12; and 2/22/12. (MAL)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER ATTACHED staying ruling on #550 the Emergency Motion to Vacate or Modify Orders and to Dissolve Writs of Execution/Garnishment or, Alternatively, to Stay and #551 the Emergency Motion to Stay Sale of Property, Based on Innocent Owner Status, and to Set Aside Writs of Execution, pending issuance of a final decision in the Mercurio appeal; terminating these Motions from pending status; reminding Plaintiffs that [381, 459, 519, 540] the Court's previous stay orders remain in full force and effect; and staying all proceedings in this case relating to the issuance, compliance, and enforcement of previously issued writs of garnishment, including the sales of the properties which are the subject of the instant motions scheduled for February 29, 2012, pending further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 2/22/2012. (DMB)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER of USCA as to #276 Notice of appeal filed by Mercurio International S.A., #284 Notice of appeal filed by Mercurio International S.A., that on 3/17/11, this Court issued an order that temporarily stayed, pending further order of this Court, the District Court's 3/11/11 Judgment on Answer to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case. The issue of whether to keep that stay in place while these consolidated appeals remain pending is carried with the case. EOD: 2/16/12. USCA number: 11-11125-CC and 11-11690-CC (DG)
February 22, 2012 Filing 552 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Klugh on behalf of Granada Associates, Inc., Jacqueline Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Karen Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Laura Saieh, Sandra Saieh (Klugh, Richard)
February 21, 2012 Filing 551 Emergency MOTION to stay Marshal's Sale re #439 Writ issued, #543 US Marshal 285 form, #438 Writ issued, #421 Order on motion for writ of execution, Third Party MOTION to vacate #439 Writ issued, #543 US Marshal 285 form, #438 Writ issued, #421 Order on motion for writ of execution by Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh, Jacqueline Saieh, Kathya Saieh, Jaime Saieh, Laura Saieh, Sandra Saieh, Karen Saieh, Granada Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Klugh, Richard)
February 21, 2012 Filing 550 Emergency MOTION to vacate Orders [DE 323, 421] and to quash resulting writs of garnishment and execution by Plainview Florida II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Ricardo Bichara)(Tein, Michael)
February 2, 2012 Filing 549 PROOF of service by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit publication Feb. 1 of Notice of Sale, #2 Exhibit Notice of Sale issued by Marshal DeSouza, #3 Exhibit Feb. 1 certified mail envelopes)(Korvick, Tony)
February 1, 2012 Filing 548 **TERMINATED. COUNSEL TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT CODE.**NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell Proof of Service of Notice of Sale (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Feb. 1, 2012 publication of Notice of Sale, #2 Exhibit Notice of Sale signed by SDFL Marshal DeSouza)(Korvick, Tony) Modified on 2/2/2012 (DMS).
January 31, 2012 Filing 547 NOTICE of Appearance by Lilly Ann Sanchez on behalf of Brunello, Ltd. (Sanchez, Lilly)
January 20, 2012 Filing 546 RESPONSE in opposition re #545 Third Party MOTION to quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit service returns on subpoenas)(Korvick, Tony)
January 16, 2012 Filing 545 Third Party MOTION to quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum by Armando Jaar, Ricardo Jaar, Abdala Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh, Carmen Siman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Klugh, Richard)
January 12, 2012 Filing 544 STATUS REPORT on Order Directing TRIA Execution on Real Property DE 421 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
January 11, 2012 Filing 543 US Marshal 285 form for U.S. Marshals Levy of Writs of Execution on Real Property [DE 438, 439] pursuant to Order DE 421 by posting on property 11-29-11. (Korvick, Tony)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER of USCA as to #297 Notice of appeal filed by Jose Antonio Celis, that upon review of appellant's motion for reconsideration of our 10/20/11 order dismissing this appeal for lack of jurisdiction is denied. EOD: 12/14/11 USCA number: 11-13641-C (DG)
December 5, 2011 Filing 541 RESPONSE to motion re #523 Third Party MOTION to alter judgmentThird Party MOTION to amend/correct #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 JudgmentThird Party MOTION to deposit fundsThird Party MOTION for extension of time to file documentThird Party MOTION to stay Execution re #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 JudgmentThird Party MOTION to amend/correct #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 JudgmentThird Party MOTION to stay Execution re #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 JudgmentThird Party MOTION to amend/correct #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 JudgmentThird Party MOTION to stay Execution re #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 Judgment filed by Ocean Bank. (Mora, Martha)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER ATTACHED staying ruling on #478 Claimant Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera's Motion for Relief From Judgment and Related Orders and #479 Motion for Dissolution of Writ of Garnishment and Related Relief and #482 Claimants Carmen Siman de Jaar, Armando Jaar, Ricardo Jaar, Carlos Saieh, and Moises Saieh's Motion to Dissolve Writs of Garnishment, Motion to Set Aside Ex Parte Orders Granting Writs of Execution and Discharge, Request for Evidentiary Hearing, and Motion to Stay Execution of, and to Alter, Amend, and Obtain Relief From Judgment and #523 Motion to Dissolve Writs of Garnishment, Motion to Set Aside Ex Parte Orders Granting Writs of Execution, Request for Evidentiary Hearing, and Motion to Continue Stay of All Proceedings in This Case Relating to Previously Issued Writs of Garnishment. The Motions are terminated from pending status, to be reactivated upon conclusion of the Mercurio appeal. The Court's stay orders [381, 459, 519] shall remain in full force and effect pending the final decision in the Mercurio appeal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/5/2011. (DMB)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER ATTACHED granting #511 HSBC Bank USA, N.A.'s Amended Motion for Clarification as to Effectiveness of Writ to the extent that the Court holds that #371 the Writ is still effective. However, the enforcement of previously issued writs of garnishment remains stayed pending further order of this Court. (See Dkt. 519.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/5/2011. (DMB)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER ATTACHED denying #480 Claimant Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera's Motion for Disqualification and denying as moot #529 Claimant Diaz Herrera's Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/5/2011. (DMB)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #503 motion to dissolve writ of garnishment and to vacate or modify order granting writs of execution/garnishment by Bauza, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 12/2/2011. (DMB)
December 1, 2011 Filing 536 NOTICE of withdrawal and dismissal of writ of garnishment DE 361 by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #503 MOTION to vacate #326 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #400 Writ issued Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment and to Vacate or Modify Order Granting Writs of Execution/Garnishment MOTION to vacate #326 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #400 Writ issued Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment and to Vacate or Modify Order Granting Writs of Execution/Garnishment (Korvick, Tony) Modified on 12/2/2011 (BES).
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #507 HSBC Bank N.A.'s Motion for Clarification as to Effectiveness of Writ (Dkt 371) in light of HSBC Bank N.A.'s filing of #511 its amended motion. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/29/2011. (DMB)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ENDORSED ORDER granting #532 Agreed Motion For Extension of Time to File Response to #503 Motion to Quash Writ of Garnishment. Plaintiffs shall file their response on or before 12/2/11. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/29/2011. (DMB)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #515 Third Party Bauza's Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment and to Vacate or Modify Order Granting Writs of Execution/Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/29/2011.(DMB)
November 28, 2011 Filing 532 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #503 MOTION to vacate #326 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #400 Writ issued Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment and to Vacate or Modify Order Granting Writs of Execution/Garnishment MOTION to vacate #326 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #400 Writ issued Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment and to Vacate or Modify Order Granting Writs of Execution/Garnishment by All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Newton) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
November 28, 2011 Filing 531 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Bauza, Inc. re #515 MOTION to vacate #400 Writ issued, #395 Order on motion for writ of garnishment Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment and to Vacate or Modify Order Granting Writs of Execution/Garnishment MOTION to vacate #400 Writ issued, #395 Order on motion for writ of garnishment Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment and to Vacate or Modify Order Granting Writs of Execution/Garnishment filed by Bauza, Inc. (Losego, Clinton)
November 28, 2011 Filing 530 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #402 Writ issued, #399 Writ issued, #401 Writ issued, #400 Writ issued of Withdrawal and Dismissal of Writs of Garnishment DE 399, 400, 401 and 402 (Korvick, Tony)
November 28, 2011 Filing 529 MOTION for issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects)(Rosenbaum, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ENDORSED ORDER granting #527 Third Party Motion for Leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Motions to Dissolve Garnishment, for Stay, and for Deposit of Funds into Court Registry. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/28/2011. (DMB)
November 27, 2011 Filing 527 Third Party MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Motions to Dissolve Garnishment, for Stay, and for Deposit of Funds into Court Registry by Abdala Saieh, Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh, Carmen Siman. (Klugh, Richard)
November 22, 2011 Filing 526 US Marshal 285 form for Ocean Bank SDNT writs of garnishment. (Korvick, Tony)
November 22, 2011 Filing 525 REPLY to response to motion re #480 MOTION to disqualify judge and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Rosenbaum, Joseph)
November 22, 2011 Filing 524 RESPONSE in opposition re #523 Third Party MOTION to alter judgmentThird Party MOTION to amend/correct #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 JudgmentThird Party MOTION to deposit fundsThird Party MOTION for extension of time to file documentThird Party MOTION to stay Execution re #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 JudgmentThird Party MOTION to amend/correct #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 JudgmentThird Party MOTION to stay Execution re #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 JudgmentThird Party MOTION to amend/correct #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 JudgmentThird Party MOTION to stay Execution re #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 Judgment filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Korvick, Tony)
November 21, 2011 Filing 523 Third Party MOTION to alter judgment, Third Party MOTION to amend/correct #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 Judgment, Third Party MOTION to deposit funds, Third Party MOTION for extension of time to file document, Third Party MOTION to stay Execution re #455 Order on motion for judgment, #331 Writ issued, #332 Writ issued, #390 Order on motion for clarification, #476 Stipulation, #337 Writ issued, #458 Judgment by Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh, Carmen Siman, Abdala Saieh. (Klugh, Richard)
November 16, 2011 Filing 522 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment (Amended Answer) by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis)
November 16, 2011 Filing 521 RESPONSE in opposition re #507 MOTION for clarification re #371 Writ issued HSBC Bank N.A.'s Motion for Clarification as to Effectiveness of Writ (Dkt 371) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #511 MOTION to amend/correct #371 Writ issued HSBC Bank USA, N.A.'s Amended Motion for Clarification As To Effectiveness of Writ (Dkt 371) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DOJ pleading: Abdala Saieh (deceased), #2 Exhibit USMS Proof of Service HSBC Oct. 11, 2011)(Korvick, Tony)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #482 motion to stay. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/16/2011. (DMB)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER ATTACHED staying all proceedings in this case relating to the issuance, compliance, and enforcement of previously issued writs of garnishment pending pending the Court's resolution of the myriad motions recently filed challenging this Court's previous rulings with regard to the issuance of writs of garnishment; directing that all previous stay orders entered at dockets 381 and 459 shall remain in full force and effect pending further order; and directing that the parties to those motions are directed to furnish courtesy copies to the Court within 7 days. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/16/2011. (DMB)
November 15, 2011 Filing 518 RESPONSE in opposition re #482 MOTION to quash Garnishment MOTION for reconsideration re #323 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #415 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #396 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #324 Order on motion for writ of garnishment MOTION for relief from judgment re #415 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #459 Order on motion to quashOrder on motion for judgmentOrder on motion to vacate MOTION to set aside judgment MOTION to stay Garnishment MOTION to deposit funds into court registry MOTION for reconsideration re #323 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #415 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #396 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #324 Order on motion for writ of garnishment MOTION for relief from judgment re #415 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #459 Order on motion to quashOrder on motion for judgmentOrder on motion to vacate MOTION for reconsideration re #323 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #415 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #396 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #324 Order on motion for writ of garnishment MOTION for relief from judgment re #415 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #459 Order on motion to quashOrder on motion for judgmentOrder on motion to vacate filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Korvick, Tony)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ENDORSED ORDER granting #516 unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/15/2011. (DMB)
November 15, 2011 Filing 516 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file excess pages for Response to DE 482 by All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Newton)
November 14, 2011 Filing 515 MOTION to vacate #400 Writ issued, #395 Order on motion for writ of garnishment Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment and to Vacate or Modify Order Granting Writs of Execution/Garnishment by Bauza, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Losego, Clinton)
November 14, 2011 Filing 514 RESPONSE in opposition re #479 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for dissolution of Writ of Garnishment filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Porter, Newton)
November 14, 2011 Filing 513 RESPONSE in opposition re #478 MOTION for relief from judgment and Related Orders and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Porter, Newton)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ENDORSED ORDER granting #510 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. No further briefing will be allowed. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/14/2011. (CCB)
November 14, 2011 Filing 511 MOTION to amend/correct #371 Writ issued HSBC Bank USA, N.A.'s Amended Motion for Clarification As To Effectiveness of Writ (Dkt 371) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by HSBC Bank, USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hendrix, David)
November 14, 2011 Filing 510 MOTION for leave to file excess pages in Reply to Plaintiffs' 44-Page Response by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera. (Rosenbaum, Joseph)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ENDORSED ORDER granting #508 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. No further briefing will be allowed. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/14/2011. (CCB)
November 14, 2011 Filing 508 MOTION for leave to file excess pages for Response to DE 478 by All Plaintiffs. (Porter, Newton)
November 11, 2011 Filing 507 MOTION for clarification re #371 Writ issued HSBC Bank N.A.'s Motion for Clarification as to Effectiveness of Writ (Dkt 371) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by HSBC Bank, USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hendrix, David)
November 11, 2011 Filing 506 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re #372 HSBC Bank USA N.A.'s Answer to Writ of Execution Garnishment by HSBC Bank, USA. (Hendrix, David) Modified on 11/14/2011 adding link to Writ (LYB).
November 11, 2011 Filing 505 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re #371 HSBC Bank USA N.A.'s Answer to Writ of Execution Garnishment by HSBC Bank, USA. (Hendrix, David) Modified on 11/14/2011 adding link to Writ (LYB).
November 11, 2011 Filing 504 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re #370 HSBC Bank USA N.A.'s Answer to Writ of Exeuction Garnishment by HSBC Bank, USA. (Hendrix, David) Modified on 11/14/2011 adding link to Writ (LYB).
November 11, 2011 Filing 503 MOTION to vacate #326 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #400 Writ issued Motion to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment and to Vacate or Modify Order Granting Writs of Execution/Garnishment by Bauza, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Losego, Clinton)
November 11, 2011 Filing 502 *** INCORRECT EVENT CODE, COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE AS A MOTION *** REPLY to response to motion re #480 MOTION to disqualify judge and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera. (Rosenbaum, Joseph) Modified on 11/14/2011 (LYB).
November 10, 2011 Sealed document S-8. (DMS)
November 10, 2011 Sealed document S-7. (BES)
November 9, 2011 Filing 501 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton R. Losego on behalf of Banco Santander International (Losego, Clinton)
November 9, 2011 Filing 500 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment [DE 411] Regarding Mirasol International Limited by Banco Santander International. (Losego, Clinton)
November 9, 2011 Filing 499 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment [DE 412] Regarding Kelvedon Limited by Banco Santander International. (Losego, Clinton)
November 9, 2011 Filing 498 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #497 Response in opposition to motion of Filing Substitute Exhibit DE 497-3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Substitute DE 497-3 (NDTX Aug. 19, 2011 Amended Opinion and Order in U.S. v Holy Land Foundation))(Korvick, Tony)
November 9, 2011 Filing 497 RESPONSE in opposition re #480 MOTION to disqualify judge and Incorporated Memorandum of Law [refiled pursuant to DE 496] filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wells Fargo counsel's e-mail Jan 26, 2011, #2 Exhibit corrected certified English translation, #3 Exhibit Aug. 19, 2011 NDTX Amended Opinion and Order U.S. v Holy Land Foundation)(Korvick, Tony)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER denying as moot #494 Motion to strike ; granting #495 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 11/9/2011. (SKH)
November 8, 2011 Sealed documents S-3 through S-6. (BES)
November 8, 2011 Filing 495 MOTION for leave to file excess pages by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
November 8, 2011 Filing 494 MOTION to strike #493 Response in opposition to motion to Motion for Disqualification by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera. (Rosenbaum, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
November 8, 2011 Filing 493 RESPONSE in opposition re #480 MOTION to disqualify judge and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wells Fargo counsel e-mail Jan. 26, 2011, #2 Exhibit corrected certified English transltion, #3 Exhibit US v Holy Land Foundation, NDTX Amended Opinion and Order Aug. 19, 2011)(Korvick, Tony)
November 7, 2011 Filing 492 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re. Jaime Dib Mor Saab by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis)
November 7, 2011 Filing 491 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re. Fabio E. Ochoa by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis)
November 7, 2011 Filing 490 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re. Carmen E. de Jaar a/k/a Carmen Elena Siman de Jaar by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis)
November 7, 2011 Filing 489 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re. Brunello LTD by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis)
November 7, 2011 Filing 488 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re. Bermudez Suaza, P.A. and Sanchez Martell, J.C. by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis)
November 7, 2011 Filing 487 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re. Armando Jacob Jaar Jacir by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis)
November 7, 2011 Filing 486 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward)
November 7, 2011 Filing 485 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward)
November 7, 2011 Filing 484 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Mullins, Edward)
November 2, 2011 Filing 483 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Klugh on behalf of Armando Jaar, Ricardo Jaar, Carlos Saieh, Moises Saieh, Carmen Siman (Klugh, Richard)
November 2, 2011 Filing 482 MOTION to quash Garnishment, MOTION for reconsideration re #323 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #415 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #396 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #324 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, MOTION for relief from judgment re #415 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #459 Order on motion to quashOrder on motion for judgmentOrder on motion to vacate, MOTION to set aside judgment, MOTION to stay Garnishment, MOTION to deposit funds into court registry by Carmen Siman, Armando Jaar, Ricardo Jaar, Moises Saieh, Carlos Saieh. (Klugh, Richard)
November 1, 2011 Filing 481 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell of Non-Appeal and Request for Lift of Stay (Korvick, Tony)
October 31, 2011 Filing 480 MOTION to disqualify judge and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Rosenbaum, Joseph)
October 31, 2011 Filing 479 MOTION for miscellaneous relief specifically for Dissolution of Writ of Garnishment and Related Relief and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Appendix to Exhibit 5)(Rosenbaum, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Modified on 11/1/2011 (BSN).
October 31, 2011 Filing 478 MOTION for relief from judgment and Related Orders and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Appendix to Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Rosenbaum, Joseph)
October 31, 2011 Filing 477 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S. Rosenbaum on behalf of Jose Ricaurte Diaz Herrera (Rosenbaum, Joseph)
October 28, 2011 Filing 476 STIPULATION re #458 Judgment of Full Compliance and Turnover of SDNT Account Proceeds by Garnishee Ocean Bank by Ocean Bank. (Mora, Martha)
October 28, 2011 Filing 475 NOTICE of Appearance by David Stockton Hendrix on behalf of HSBC Bank, USA (Hendrix, David)
October 25, 2011 Filing 474 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Luis Carlos Gamboa Morales and Gamboa and Gamboa by Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited. (Gonzalez, Ricardo)
October 25, 2011 Filing 473 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Luis Carlos Gamboa Morales and Campus Research, Inc. by Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited. (Gonzalez, Ricardo)
October 25, 2011 Filing 472 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Luis Carlos Gamboa Morales and Bauza, Inc. by Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited. (Gonzalez, Ricardo)
October 25, 2011 Filing 471 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Luis Carlos Gamboa Morales and Bauza, Inc. by Stanchart Securities International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gonzalez, Ricardo)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER of USCA as to #297 Notice of appeal filed by Jose Antonio Celis, that this appeal is dismissed, sua sponte, for lack of jurisdiction. See Order for details. EOD: 10/20/11; Issued as mandate. USCA number: 11-13641-C (DG)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER ATTACHED denying as unnecessary #468 Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion for Clarification and denying as moot #468 the motion for enlargement of time. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/24/2011. (DMB)
October 21, 2011 Filing 468 MOTION for clarification re #459 Order on motion to quashOrder on motion for judgmentOrder on motion to vacate, MOTION to extend time to Answer Writs of Garnishment by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis)
October 20, 2011 Filing 467 US Marshal 285 form for Writs of Garnishment (6). (CD)
October 20, 2011 Filing 466 US Marshal 285 form for Writs of Garnishment (3). (CD)
October 20, 2011 Filing 465 US Marshal 285 form for Writs of Garnishment (1). (CD)
October 20, 2011 Filing 464 US Marshal 285 form for Writs of Garnishment (3). (CD)
October 20, 2011 Filing 463 US Marshal 285 form for Writs of Garnishment (2). (CD)
October 20, 2011 Filing 462 US Marshal 285 form for Writs of Garnishment (5). (CD)
October 20, 2011 Filing 461 US Marshal 285 form for Writs of Garnishment (2). (CD)
October 20, 2011 Sealed document S-2. (CD)
October 20, 2011 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding certified copy of Order #459 re #276 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 11-11125-CC (DG)
October 19, 2011 Sealed document S-1. (BSN)
October 19, 2011 Filing 460 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #448 Amended MOTION for TRIA Turnover Judgment on Garnishee's Answers DE 436, 437 judgment Wells Fargo filed by Keith Stansell, Greer C. Janis, Marc Gonsalves, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis Withdrawal of DE 448, DE 448-1, DE 448-2 (Porter, Newton)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER denying #441 Motion to quash; denying without prejudice #448 Motion for judgment; denying without prejudice #449 Motion for judgment; denying #451 Motion to quash; denying #451 Motion to vacate. All proceedings to enforce the previously issued writs of garnishment are stayed pending the outcome of any interlocutory appeal from this order. Plaintiffs are directed not to serve any unserved writs of garnishment pending the outcome of any interlocutory appeal from this order. Plaintiffs are directed not to file any additional motions seeking the issuance of writs of garnishment pending the outcome of any interlocutory appeal from this order. Plaintiffs are directed to serve a copy of this order on all of the entities to which writs of garnishment have previously been issued. (See attached order for complete details.)Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/19/2011. (SKH)
October 18, 2011 Filing 458 TURNOVER JUDGMENT on answers to writ of garnishment in a civil case (Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara) (JLH)
October 18, 2011 Filing 457 RESPONSE in opposition re #451 MOTION to quash Writs of Garnishment MOTION to vacate #409 Writ issued, #410 Writ issued, #408 Writ issued, #397 Order on motion for writ of garnishment MOTION to vacate #409 Writ issued, #410 Writ issued, #408 Writ issued, #397 Order on motion for writ of garnishment filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ENDORSED ORDER denying #452 Motion for leave to file response. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/18/2011. (SKH) Modified for clerical error on 10/18/2011 (DMB).
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER granting #444 Motion for judgment. (Turover Judgment on Answers to Writ of Garnishment in a Civil Case). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/18/2011. (SKH)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER granting #440 Motion for entry of order of discharge re Falcon International Bank. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/18/2011. (SKH)
October 18, 2011 Filing 453 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell re #434 Answer to Writ of Garnishment of Withdrawal of proposed Judgment DE 449-2 Only Without Prejudice (Korvick, Tony)
October 17, 2011 Filing 452 MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Bank of America's Motion to Quash Writs of Garnishment and to Vacate Order by Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, Dennis)
October 17, 2011 Filing 451 MOTION to quash Writs of Garnishment, MOTION to vacate #409 Writ issued, #410 Writ issued, #408 Writ issued, #397 Order on motion for writ of garnishment by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Redactetd Declaration of J. Kelley Nevling, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of J. Kelley Nevling, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of J. Kelley Nevling, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of J. Kelley Nevling)(Mullins, Edward)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #442 Motion for judgment. Amended Motion filed. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/17/2011. (SKH)
October 16, 2011 Filing 449 Amended MOTION for TRIA Turnover Judgment on Garnishee's Answers DE 433, 434, 435 judgment [Amending prior Motion 442] by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Answer DE 433, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Answer DE 434, #3 Text of Proposed Order on Answer DE 435)(Korvick, Tony)
October 16, 2011 Filing 448 Amended MOTION for TRIA Turnover Judgment on Garnishee's Answers DE 436, 437 judgment Wells Fargo by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Newton)
October 14, 2011 Filing 447 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint Writof Execution/Garnishment dated September 7, 2011, by UBS AG.(Campbell, Dennis)
October 14, 2011 Filing 446 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton R. Losego on behalf of Bauza, Inc. (Losego, Clinton)
October 14, 2011 Filing 445 REPLY to response to motion re #442 MOTION for TRIA Turnover Judgment on Wells Fargo Answers to Writs of Garnishment judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lakatos, Alex)
October 13, 2011 Filing 444 Unopposed MOTION for Judgment on Garnishee's Answers to SDNT Writs of Garnishment judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Judgment (unopposed))(Korvick, Tony)
October 13, 2011 Filing 443 RESPONSE in opposition re #441 MOTION to quash Writs of Garnishment and to Vacate Order Granting Writs of Garnishment filed by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. (Korvick, Tony)
October 12, 2011 Filing 442 MOTION for TRIA Turnover Judgment on Wells Fargo Answers to Writs of Garnishment judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Korvick, Tony)
October 12, 2011 Filing 441 MOTION to quash Writs of Garnishment and to Vacate Order Granting Writs of Garnishment by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Dennis)
October 12, 2011 Filing 440 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically discharge Falcon Int'l Bank for compliance with SDNT Writs by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Newton)
October 12, 2011 Filing 439 WRIT of execution issued as to C W Salman Partners. (CD)
October 12, 2011 Filing 438 WRIT of execution issued as to Salman Coral Way Partners. (CD)
October 11, 2011 Filing 437 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Martin D. H. Martinez by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dotterrer, John)
October 11, 2011 Filing 436 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Gloria Briseno by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dotterrer, John)
October 11, 2011 Filing 435 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Jamce Investments by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dotterrer, John)
October 11, 2011 Filing 434 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Luis Gamboa by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dotterrer, John)
October 11, 2011 Filing 433 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Corporacion Deportiva by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dotterrer, John)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ENDORSED ORDER granting #431 Unopposed Motion for Alex Lakatos to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/11/11. (DMB)
October 11, 2011 Filing 431 Unopposed MOTION for Alex Lakatos to appear pro hac vice by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dotterrer, John)
October 11, 2011 Filing 430 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment [D.E. 337] by Ocean Bank. (Mora, Martha)
October 11, 2011 Filing 429 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment [D.E. 335] by Ocean Bank. (Mora, Martha)
October 11, 2011 Filing 428 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment [D.E. 334] by Ocean Bank. (Mora, Martha)
October 11, 2011 Filing 427 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment [D.E. 333] by Ocean Bank. (Mora, Martha)
October 11, 2011 Filing 426 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment [D.E. 332] by Ocean Bank. (Mora, Martha)
October 11, 2011 Filing 425 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment [D.E. 331] by Ocean Bank. (Mora, Martha)
October 11, 2011 Filing 424 **NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED AT #685** WRIT of execution/garnishment issued. (CD) Modified on 4/10/2013 (RFK).
October 11, 2011 Filing 423 WRIT of execution/garnishment issued. (CD)
October 11, 2011 Filing 422 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell Full Compliance SDNT Writs Falcon Int'l Bank (Porter, Newton)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER granting #420 Motion for writ of execution. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/11/2011. (SKH)
October 7, 2011 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Alex Charles Lakatos appearing on behalf of Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $10 receipt number JAX3325.) (JNB)
October 7, 2011 Filing 420 MOTION for writ of execution on SDNT Real Property under TRIA by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. OFAC Blocking Notice, #2 Exhibit 2. OFAC Blocking Notice, #3 Exhibit 3. OFAC Blocking Notice, #4 Exhibit 4. OFAC Blocking Notice, #5 Exhibit 5. Property deeds from ORB, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Text of Proposed Order Writ - Salman Coral Way Partners [SDNT], #8 Text of Proposed Order Writ C W Salman Partners [SDNT])(Korvick, Tony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER granting #417 Motion for writ of execution/garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/7/2011. (SKH)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER granting #416 Motion for writ of execution/garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 10/7/2011. (SKH)
October 5, 2011 Filing 417 MOTION for writ of execution and SDNT Turnover under TRIA to Banco Do Brasil, SA by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Writ)(Korvick, Tony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
October 5, 2011 Filing 416 MOTION for writ of execution Oppenheimer by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Newton) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting #414 Motion for entry of an order discharging Terrabank, N.A. for Terrabank, N.A.'s full compliance with sixteen (16) specially designated narcotics trafficker writs of garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/28/2011. (see order) (MSS)
September 26, 2011 Filing 414 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Entry of Order of Discharge for Garnishee Terrabank, N.A. After Full Compliance and Turnover of SDNT Account Proceeds by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Korvick, Tony)
September 26, 2011 Filing 413 NOTICE of compliance re #354 Writ issued, #323 Order on motion for writ of garnishment, #379 Writ issued, #351 Writ issued, #350 Writ issued, #343 Writ issued, #356 Writ issued, #345 Writ issued, #355 Writ issued, #352 Writ issued, #344 Writ issued, #342 Writ issued, #377 Writ issued, #376 Writ issued, #346 Writ issued, #347 Writ issued, #341 Writ issued, #340 Writ issued, #348 Writ issued, #353 Writ issued, #378 Writ issued and Turnover of SDNT Blocked Account Proceeds by Garnishee Terrabank, N.A. by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
September 20, 2011 Filing 412 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Banco Santander International as to Kelvedon, Ltd. (MRH)
September 20, 2011 Filing 411 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Banco Santander International as to Mirasol International Limited. (MRH)
September 20, 2011 Filing 410 WRIT of Garnishment issued to JPMorgan Chase & Co. as to Obursatiles. (MRH)
September 20, 2011 Filing 409 WRIT of Garnishment issued to JPMorgan Chase & Co. as to Operaciones Bursatiles S.A. (MRH)
September 20, 2011 Filing 408 WRIT of Garnishment issued to JPMorgan Chase & Co. as to Phanor Arizabaleta. (MRH)
September 20, 2011 Filing 407 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Bank of America, N.A., a division of Bank of America Corporation as to Pedro Antonio Bermudez Suaza (a/k/a Bermudez Suaza P.A.) and Julio Cesar Carlos Sanchez Martell (a/k/a Sanchez Martell J.C.). (MRH)
September 20, 2011 Filing 406 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Bank of America, N.A., a division of Bank of America Corporation as to Jaime Dib Mor Saab. (MRH)
September 20, 2011 Filing 405 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Bank of America, N.A., a division of Bank of America Corporation as to Fabio E. Ochoa. (MRH)
September 20, 2011 Filing 404 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Bank of America, N.A., a division of Bank of America Corporation as to Carmen E. de Jaar a/k/a Carmen Elena Siman de Jaar. (MRH)
September 20, 2011 Filing 403 QUASHED PER #898 ORDER WRIT of Garnishment issued to Bank of America, N.A., a division of Bank of American Corporation as to Brunello Ltd. (MRH) Modified on 1/27/2015 (BSN).
September 20, 2011 Filing 402 WRIT of Garrnishment issued to Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Ltd. as to Luis Carlos Gamboa Morales orCampus Research Inc. (MRH)
September 20, 2011 Filing 401 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Ltd. as to Luis Carlos Gamboa Morales or Gamboa and Gamboa. (MRH)
September 20, 2011 Filing 400 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Stanchart Securities International, Inc. as to Luis Carlos Gamboa Morales/BAUZA, Inc. (MRH)
September 20, 2011 Filing 399 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Ltd. as to Luis Carlos Gamboa Moralesor BAUZA, Inc. (MRH)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER granting #394 Motion for writ of garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/19/2011. (SKH)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting #393 Motion for writ of garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/19/2011. (SKH)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER granting #392 Motion for writ of garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/19/2011. (SKH)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER granting #391 Motion for writ of garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/19/2011. (SKH)
September 15, 2011 Filing 394 MOTION for writ of garnishment SDNTs to Banco Santander International by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order 6 - proposed Order, #7 Text of Proposed Order 7 - proposed Writ, #8 Text of Proposed Order 8 - proposed Writ)(Korvick, Tony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
September 15, 2011 Filing 393 MOTION for writ of garnishment SDNTs JPMorgan Chase Bank by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Newton) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
September 15, 2011 Filing 392 MOTION for writ of garnishment SDNT to Bank of America by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Text of Proposed Order 16, #17 Text of Proposed Order 17 - Writ, #18 Text of Proposed Order 18 - Writ, #19 Text of Proposed Order 19 - Writ, #20 Text of Proposed Order 20 - Writ, #21 Text of Proposed Order 21 - Writ, #22 Text of Proposed Order 22 - Writ)(Korvick, Tony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
September 15, 2011 Filing 391 MOTION for writ of garnishment SDNTs Standard Chartered Bank by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Newton) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER ATTACHED granting #389 Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion for Clarification of Order DE 381. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/14/2011. (DMB)
September 13, 2011 Filing 389 MOTION for clarification AGREED to by U.S.A. by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
September 13, 2011 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding certified copy of endorsed order 388 denying motion to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency #387 re #297 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 11-13641-C (DG)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ENDORSED ORDER that upon due consideration #387 Defendants Motion to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis is denied because his appeal is not taken in good faith. See 28 U.S.C. section 1915(a)(3). Defendant shall be required to pay the full amount of the appellate filing fee pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1915(b). Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/13/2011. (SKH)
September 12, 2011 Filing 387 MOTION for leave to appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Jose Antonio Celis. (DG)
September 12, 2011 Filing 386 NOTICE by United States of America of Substitution of Counsel (Zimmerman, Jonathan)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER ATTACHED denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #384 motion for clarification by all Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/9/2011. (DMB)
September 8, 2011 Filing 384 MOTION for clarification re #381 Order on motion for writ of garnishmentOrder on motion to compel by All Plaintiffs. (Korvick, Tony)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ENDORSED ORDER that for the reasons stated in the Court's Order entered earlier today at docket 381, #382 the motion for writ of garnishment as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by all Plaintiffs is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/8/2011. (DMB)
September 8, 2011 Filing 382 MOTION for writ of garnishment JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Newton) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER ATTACHED denying without prejudice to being renewed depending on the outcome of the Mercurio appeal #349 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, as well as [328,329] Plaintiffs' Motions for Issuance of Writs of Garnishment; staying all proceedings to enforce the previously issued writs of garnishment pending the outcome of the Mercurio appeal; directing Plaintiffs to serve a copy of this order on all entities to which writs of garnishment have previously been served; and directing Plaintiffs not to serve any unserved writs of garnishment until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lazzara on 9/8/2011. (DMB)
September 8, 2011 Filing 380 Remark: Original Writs of Execution #376, #377, #378, and #379 sent to Attorney Tony Korvick. (MRH)
September 8, 2011 Filing 379 WRIT of Execution issued to Terrabank, N.A. Safe Deposit Box 141 (Abdala Saieh, Moises Saieh). (MRH)
September 8, 2011 Filing 378 WRIT of Execution issued to Terrabank, N.A. Safe Deposit Box 92 (Carlos Saieh, Abdala Saieh). (MRH)
September 8, 2011 Filing 377 WRIT of Execution issued to Terrabank, N.A. Safe Deposit Box 128 (Armando J. Jaar, Carmen S. de Jaar). (MRH)
September 8, 2011 Filing 376 WRIT of Execution issued to Terrabank, N.A. Safe Deposit Box 114 (Ricardo Jaar, Armando Jaar, Moises Saieh, CarlosSaieh). (MRH)
September 8, 2011 Filing 375 NOTICE by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Greer C. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell of Filing Amended Proposed Order for DE 329-03 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Newton)
September 7, 2011 Filing 374 WRIT of Garnishment issued to HSBC Bank USA, N.A. as to Alonso Olarte Lombana, a/k/a Rafael Gutierrez. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 373 WRIT of Garnishment issued to HSBC Bank USA, N.A. as to Milagros A. Zevallos Gonzales; Sara M. Zevellos Gonzales. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 372 WRIT of Garnishment issued to HSBC Bank USA, N.A. as to Harvy Ramiro Rengifo Amaya. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 371 WRIT of Garnishment issued to HSBC Bank USA, N.A. as to Abdala Saieh Jassir or Moises Saieh or Carlos Saieh or Carlos Ernesto Saieh Jamis. (MRH) (MRH).
September 7, 2011 Filing 370 WRIT of Garnishment issued to HSBC Bank USA, N.A. as to Moises Abdala Saieh Muvdi. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 369 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as to Nueva Industria De Ganaderos De Culiacan. (MRH) Modified on 9/8/2011 (MRH).
September 7, 2011 Filing 368 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as to Lorenzo Arce Flores. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 367 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as to Juan P. Villalobos. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 366 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as to Martin David Hodwalker Martinez. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 365 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as to Gloria E. Briseno. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 364 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as to Fernando M. Zevallos. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 363 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as to Aero Continente, S.A. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 362 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Wells Fargo Bank, N.Z. as to JAMCE Investments Ltd. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 361 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Wells Fargo Bank as to Luis Gamboa or BAUZA, Inc. (MRH) Modified on 12/2/2011 writ dismissed per #536 notice of withdrawl(BES).
September 7, 2011 Filing 360 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as to Corporacion Deportiva America. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 359 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Falcon International Bank as to Luis Pacheco Mejia. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 358 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Falcon International Bank as to Mario A. Flores Salinas. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 357 WRIT of Garnishment issued to UBS AG, a/k/a UBS AG Miami Agency as to Carmen Elena Siman de Jaar. (MRH) Modified on 9/8/2011 (MRH).
September 7, 2011 Filing 356 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to Salman Coral Way Partners. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 355 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to Plainview Florida II Inc. (MRH) Modified on 9/8/2011 (MRH).
September 7, 2011 Filing 354 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to C.W. Salman Partners. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 353 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to MLA Investments Inc. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 352 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to Villarosa Investments Florida, Inc. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 351 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to Karen Overseas, Inc. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 350 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to Granada Asociates, Inc. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 349 MOTION to compel SunTrust Bank, N.A. to Release SDNTK Proceeds in Compliance With Court Ordered Post-Judgment Garnishment Proceedings and Memo of Law by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Text of Proposed Order 9)(Korvick, Tony)
September 7, 2011 Filing 348 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to ALM Investment Florida, Inc. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 347 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to Confecciones Lord S.A. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 346 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to Jacaria Florida, Inc. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 345 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to Carlos Saieh. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 344 WRIT of Garnishment issued as to Terrabank, N.A. as to Moises Saieh. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 343 WRIT of Garnishment issued as to Terrabank, N.A. as to Abdala Saieh, Moises Saieh. (MRH) Modified on 9/8/2011 (MRH).
September 7, 2011 Filing 342 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to Carlos Saieh, Abdala Saieh. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 341 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to Carmen Elena S. de Jaar. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 340 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Terrabank, N.A. as to Ricardo Jaar, Armando Jaar, Moises Saieh, Carlos Saieh. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 339 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Ocean Bank, N.A. as to OK Coffee International, S.A. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 338 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Ocean Bank, N.A. as to Invara S en C, a/k/a Invara S.C.S. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 337 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Ocean Bank, N.A. as to Abdala Saieh or Moises Saieh or Carlos Ernesto Saieh Jamis (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 336 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Ocean Bank, N.A. as to Hernan Dario Anango Madrigal. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 335 WRIT of Garnishment issued as to Ocean Bank, N.A. as to Maria Del Carmen Ospina Prada. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 334 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Ocean Bank, N.A. as to ALM Investment Florida, Inc. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 333 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Ocean Bank, N.A. as to Sunset & 97th Holdings, LLC. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 332 WRIT of Garnishment issued as to Ocean Bank, N.A. as to Abdala Saieh or Moises Saieh. (MRH) Modified on 9/7/2011 (MRH).
September 7, 2011 Filing 331 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Ocean Bank, N.A. as to Carmen Elena Jaar. (MRH)
September 7, 2011 Filing 330 WRIT of Garnishment issued to Ocean Bank, N.A. as to Aero Continente, S.A. (MRH)
September 6, 2011 Filing 329 MOTION for writ of garnishment Standard Chartered Bank & StanChart Securities by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Newton) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.