IN RE: Wright Medical Technology, Inc., Conserve Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: J'Renee Dickson, D. Scott McIntosh, David Herold, Dorothy Ann Wilson, Jean B. Hastings, Harry Jacobs, Denise Calzada, Harry Sakjas, Jr., Randy Scott Bradshaw, Richard E. Watson, Bacilio L. Trujillo, Carole Kearn, Vickie Branham, David True, Phyllis Brenneman, Ronald Radach, James V. Holmes, Bonnie Sue Bogert, David Albright, Michael Abegg, Michaela Braasch, David Kirkley, Dan Offrell, William Earl Cook, Jr., Ronald D. Barth, Ronald Diercksen, Hiram Glenn, Jr., Tamara Koenig, Ronald Kimsey, Pam Whitbeck, Otis Collier, Jace Dees, David Jaramillo, Kathy Wilson, Kermit Walker, Coleman Jarrett, David Cochran, Joseph Abel LaRue, Jr., Marsha Moore, James McQuerry, Brad G. Warren, Tammi Armstrong, Jeannie Lansdell, Ginger Davis, Evelyne Lois Such, Mary Baker, Marilyn Katz, Angelika Black, Melvin Ray Meyer, Judith Marketos, Ben Fillmore, Jacqueline Ames, Vera McClelland, Nancy Dolensek, James Tice, Barry Wilk, Jeanne M. Schifano, Michelle Williams, Virginia Ann Snyder, Evelyn Jones, Twyla Clarke, Phyllis Coleman, Nona Zwirnmann, Rita Nail, John Goromboly, Joann Case, Marjorie Aiello, Guy P. Giasson, Linda Hyde, Clifton Short, Robert Douglas, Keisha S. Zwald, Norma Johnson, Mary Weed, Andlle Naeter, Richard E. Bogert, Kelley Renee Hamilton, Gene Arnold, Gordon Thrall, Angela Pokorny, Mary Rehberger, Linda K. Floyd, Carol Teig, Ruth Ann Long, Naomi E. Hooker, Sadie Calvert, Mark A. Clausen, Mark Palmer, Michael Sullivan, Kathleen A. Doyle, Debra Korszeniewski, Brian K. Dameron, Michael McGrady, Lawrence Dougherty, Jr., James Dirk Owens, Steven Wilson, Joan M. Leitner, William Sobek, June Feldman, Thomas E. Birmingham, Barbara A. Alexander, Cathleen Claussenius, Michael Woodworth, Ruth Ziegler, Kristine M. Mason, Lauren Vanston, Vivian Petrovic, Willie Alexander, Kathleen Minadeo Johnson, Oscar C. Pokorny, Brian M. Day, William L. Watkins, III, Gina Bianckino, Susan Willing, Bruce Stevenson, Peggy Rittenhouse, Otto Herbert Barnhouse, Emma Jean Johnson, Francine Degenhardt, Mary Louise Proctor, Yefim Milter, Renee L. Spalding, James Stogner, Dolores Lentine, Michael Shane Adams, Paul J. Marino, Phillip Ray Moore, Carl Prange, Cathy Adams, William H Williams, Jr., Jacquekie Al-Khalaqi, James E. Davis, James L. Yarbrough, Dianna Kirkley, Evelyn Miller, Nancy A. Gleim, David L. Summers, Dianne A. Hall, John Smith, Sharon M. Johnson, Olga L. Martin, Timothy Hinrichs, William Montgomery, Douglas F. Anderson, Tracy Sires, Arthur E. Elliott, George David Smith, Mary J. Proffitt, Steven Birkson, Elizabeth S. Neily, Lisa Griego, Shirley Orsinelli, Glen Graves, Frances Harmon, Diane Deville, Glenn D. Stanton, Phillip Groff, Shirley Ann McCright, Richard C. Hardy, Kathy Morales, Fred Braasch, Victor Miller, Lequata Montgomery, Willa J. Allen, Ella Reed, Ruth M. Bader, Janet Sanders, Larry R. Dodd, Charles Palmer, Angela Y. Warren, Sharon Ming, Pauline Blair, Gabriella Mulcahy, Lesia Smith, Sherri Bacovsky, Hope C. Vogel, Richard Lyons, Janet M. Gunter, Doris Edelman, Carol Hutchinson, Colleen Amirr, James Wyly Watts, Jr., John Roberts, Tandra Speed, Frances Carter, Dale Yocum, Barbara Woodley, Diane Gebhart, Nancy Hoover, Diane Lattimore, Leon Thomas, Patricia Hinrichs, Sally Wilk, Bobby J. Proctor, Christine Catherine Brooks, Gina Friend, Margaret Groff, Frederick W. Jones, Doris Jean Brown, William Mowell, William Chrostowski, Frances Zeigler, Roger Kingery, Sandra B. Trujillo, Mary Ann Meiling, Cheri Dees, John Ming, Darius Perez, Andrew Maizner, Muriel Olson, Timothy A. Snider, Jeffery Butler, Nancie Feld, Nicole M. Frey, Michael Feinberg, Valerie Harward, Tina Marie Cien, Corey S. Barnard, Joseph Amirr, Denise Davis-Reno, Perry Lansdell, Phillip Meiling, Judy Yarbrough, Noreen M. Dogs, Nancy Dunn, Maria Sajeski, Eleda Cohen, Pamela Schwartz, Gail Bartels, Gilbert Tanguma, Robin True, Joseph Brown, Joshua McIntosh, Eric Herzog, Mary Constantino, Anne L. Dickerson, Kay Currens, Kathy Johnson, Michael XX Allen, Vivian Neelley, James Carter Hamilton, Lisa Owens, Nancy Stevenson, Anna L. Workman, Irwin Hoffman, Patricia DeJesus, Oscar Watson, Jr., Kathleen Herold, Amy Fine, Christine Piper, Bruce MacGurn, Gregory Moen, John Christy, Robert Giacometti, Donald Friend, Florence Christensen, Ray Bradshaw, Jr., Ronnie Weatherford, Jeffrey D. Pyper, Larry Arnold, Linda Mattison, Robyn Christiansen, Martha J. Fewell, Margreth C. Butterworth, Helen R. Hribar, Reginald Harrison, Jane Miller, Marjorie Morgan Satterthwait, Patricia Diane Horine, Steven Cross, Patricia Bowers, Douglas Armstrong, Joe F. Lopez, David L. Bonham, Kristin A. Morrow, Kathy McGee, Kathryn Cummings, Brenda G. Smith, Linda Robicheux, Hope Briggs, Jo Dawn Danley, Gary Gamble, Ana Smith, Bobbie Patterson, Gene Allan Presler, Debra Schneiderman, Robert Schacker, Kenneth Francis Pribanic, Elizabeth Stone, Robert L. Hastings, Michael Widom, Samantha Curran, Jammie McCovery, Edgar Ray Satterthwait, Nicole Reed-Olsen, Anthony Neal, Harold L. Graves, Susan Case, Bobby Reppond, Thomas Gadbois, James Stagner, John Otey, Paula Jarrett, Richard B. Croak, Dorothea McCormick, Richard Gregoire, Norma Sanders, Jeanine Thrall, Mark Hoover, Joe A. Cienfuegos, Jr., Craig J. Freebersyser, Johnnie Richardson, Teresa Barwick, Kelly Warden, Margaret Curtis, Laurel Baker, Cheryl K. Prange, Benjamin Eisenberg, Milton DeLair, John W. Wallace, Jr., Nancy Summers, Sharri S. Shively, Gloria Hollenbeck, Judith Arvoy, Wanda Carter, George Mattison, Pieternella Meuzelaar, Deborah Mancill, Patricia DeLair, Tony Mark Sellers, Dave Currens, Harold Henderson, Jr., Carole L. Vohs, Helen Soda, Marilyn R. Monson, Brian McCormick, Naysa Mowell, Larry Koenig, Geraldine Mouyios, Dorothy Jean Barnhouse, Christa Poindexter, John Borg, Katherine M. McClellan, John Bartels, Richard Robert Bourdeaux, William Kellogg, Frances Stagner, Earl Douglas Skaggs, Alberto Fierro, Annette Childs, James Calvert, Sammy Carnegie, Ellis Elton Register, Rosemary Duvall, Robert Reno, Linda M. Fishel, Virginia M Welch, James Jensen, Johnnie Alexander, Sheri Woods, Elaine Albright, Glenda G Walter, John E. Burger, Craig A. Proffitt, Beverly Marshall, Geoffrey B. Schofield, Timothy J. Poling, Terry Leroy Smith, Shirley Foliart, Robert Lentine, Tracey Huisinga, Patricia M. Day, Jeffrey E. Butler, Donald Schneiderman, Mary McClarity, Judith A. Hendrix, Hendrick Meuzelaar, Sheena Riley, Myron Dunn, Martin Metzger, Judith Ann Hildebrand, Jerry L. Johnson, Sr., Janet Pommrehn, Dayl Waters, Lisa L. Webb, Cecil Burnett, Carl Proehl, Pauline Finstad, Gene Christiansen, Sally Giacometti, Joseph A. LaRue, Charles Speed, Edward J. Cherveny, Paul Marino, Sharon D. Summers, Stephen F. Brynelson, Lavern Pfeiffer, Rod Olsen, Kim Elizabeth Manning, Brenda Vincent, Katherine Douglas, Susan L. Smith, Horace Dewayne Morgan, William R. Gleim, Angelia Moore, Melinda Sissom, Leslee Cook, Christopher J. Tsaltas, William Haverly, Darrell Hirsch, John Calvin White, Craig Steven Wilkinson, John Campbell, Bradley N. Tufts, Valerie Woodworth, Larry C. Dogs, Connie Maltin, Joanne P. Porter, Lyle Huisinga, Billy Thomas, David Lavares, Cecilia Schmidt, Gerald Gubanski, Betty L. Hall, Bobby Gene Horine, Roy Gene Lyles, Monica Janet Pribanic, Robert L. Richards, Samuel Ambler, Ford Gordon Scalley, Brian Riedell, Thomas Shortley, James Fields, Robin Solsma, Roland Smith, Royal Lee Hines, Ann Spencer, Robert Finstad, Frances C. Perkins, James Button, Shirley Fisher, Shalonda Bailey, Robert Sheets, Mauryce Kennon, Michael Daskivich, Steven L. Scott, Tareq T. Samaneh, Betty Moore, Barbara Truelick, Mary Burgart, Karyn Bentlin, Kathy Revak, Gerald Zackin, Cheryl D. Yoakum, Linda R. Hepner, Valerie Hasely, Rachel Ann Watilo, Beatrice Rotondi, Lisa Diercksen, Lisa Ishmael, Sally Quisling, Hilda Blount, Karen Arnold, Margie J. Fredrickson, Jeffrey Paul, Mark Ronald Nord, Patricia Jeffers, Michael Minton, Linda D. Rogers, Ray Anderson, Jennifer Murin, Ann Fillmore, Lanny Long, Dorothy J. Hardy, Kevin Johnson, Marilyn Eisenberg, Denise Stahl, Cne' Seals, Michael Glassco, Robert Lee Chisolm, Janell Foster Bryson, Glynn Zeigler, Russell Meier, Delbert Solsma, Pamela Peterson, Dorothy K. Barth, Stephen Nichols, Kevin Shores, Julia Timothy, Rosie M. Young, Sandra R. Graves, Wilda J. Harbison, Anthony Johnson, Seth Nydegger, Deborah Lee Tymer, Eric B. Snitkoff, Terry Meza, Jane Sprecher, Charles Plungis, Joey Daigle, Rosemary Fry, Raymond E. Hall, Sylvia Tate, Charles Edwin Shirko, Alan M. Morales, Kathy Lyons, Robert Perry, Gail Jansen, Carolyn Zackin, James Harris, Charles Edward Hundt, Harvey Arnold, Janet E. Duecy, Faye Weatherford, Lisa Elston, Linda Hebert, Mary Vicki Tanguma, Duane Robbins, Jerry Trimble, William Cain, Steven J. Bacovsky, Norman Mills, Ricky Hill, David A. Sylvester, Jan Proehl, Fred W. Fewell, Letha Brown, Danny Ray Allen, Tessa Cain, James Townsend, Greg M. Spalding, John Robicheux, III, Grace Zimmerman, Christine Powell, Steven Brown, Sr., Scott Jeffrey Porter, Lawrence Bachelder, Robert Marchlewicz, Fabian Guillen, Patricia Quiroz, Mary Destouet, Helen Crocker-Pope, Marlene A. Jennings, Jerry Smith, Linda DeHoet, Linda Radach, Beverly Morrison, Cathy MacGurn, Barry A. Cochran, Thomas Marvin York, Roger Burgart, Allison Benson, Judith Sauget, Bernard Sterling, Todd Smith, Danny L. James, Sr., Cherie M. Hanks, Steven Wacker, Ronald Sires, Roger Setterdahl, Melvin Kruse, Stephanie Wharton, Diona Davis, James Igoe, Marvin R. McIntosh, Rita L. Ortega, Mathew Neelley, Patricia Anne Shea, Enid Williams, Patrick Gandy, George Albert Williamson, Kevin L. Greenfield, James Miller, James Aldrich, Authelia Gallman, Sheldon Edelman, Dennis Abts, James Henry Garcia, Alexander Petrovic, Julie Hobert, Wendy Reppond, Joseph Richardson, Peter A. Hall, Charles Hutchinson, Donald Bowers, Jacqueline A. Hoffman, Karen Michaels, Twila Sullivan, Martin Mead, Steven Fine, Lester E. McDowell, Sylvia M. Sterling, Bertha Gamble, Terry Borg, Robert E. Whitbeck, George Fry, Jr., Galina Preobrazhenskaya, Nancy C. Johnson, Paul Trombley, Karen J. Johnson, Thomas Harward, Janne C. Gregoire, Nicholas Carl, Vincent F. Zounek, Susan Peil, Earl J. Hebert, Carmela Barone, Kenneth Miller, Shannon Strohm, Dorothy Bruce, Mark Sissom, Stephanie Bourdeaux, Sharron Palow, Carlodina J. Cruz, Beverly A. Wagner, Nikki Kellogg, Karen Block, Paula Hartwell, Jimmy Horton, Denise Carnegie, Jerry French, William Duvall, William Allan Menne, Gerald Soda, Mark Griffin, Thomas Degenhardt, Ralph Wheeler, Larita Elias, Frank L. Zwald, Dennis Pryor, GERALD DAUGHERTY, Mark Hammond, Darren Peterson, Tolling Agreement Plaintiffs, Winfred Warren, Saundra Burns, Judith Wilson, Sharlene Morgan, Diane Plungis, Billy Eugene Cox, Joann Daskivich, Franklin Lester, Joyce Tebbe, Wanda Greenfield, Antoine Tureaud, Richard Paes, Janet B. Anderson, Anita McGrady, Gayle Cannady, Victor M. Smith, Cresencio DeJesus, Joseph C. Ortega, S. Michael McCormick, Mervin Elias, France Clausen, June Harrison, Tamara Loosle, Michael C. Schaufele, Percy Holmes, James Wilson, Sheldon Buch, William Joseph Workman, Henry R. Hooker, Deborah Newton, John R. DeWolf, Michael Oseguera, Michael Allen, Kathleen Dougherty, Brenda Wilson, Taleeea Isaphine Kinsey, Robert G. Yoakum, Jr., Nancy L. Koul, Norma C. Mims, Ray Eigenbrode, Kathy L. Eliason, Robert L. Brock, Eric C. Johnson, Duke Spitzer, Theresa J. Hohenberger, Richard Sauget, Barry Mang, Donna Jackson, Carol Sue Meyer, Linda H. Scott, Edward Oksienik, Judith Richardson, Phyllis Susan Miller, Michael Ragland, Edward C. Rainville, Marilyn M. Palmer, Janice L. Hall, Farhad Shatti, David Ishmael, Linda Pyper, Ray Z. Dissinger, Larry A. Breeze, Teresa E. Sellers, Deborah L. Giasson, Ronald Jonas, Dierdre Williamson, David Dockerty, Henry Earl O'Cain, Heather A. Bianciotto, Joe Council, Diana Taylor, Jane Duke, Edna Lopez, Leilani Dow, Dennis Christensen, Carolyn Sheets, Megan Mork, Mary Grossbier, Naomi Kingery, David Burns, Dennis M. Doyle, Don Palow, Cheri A. Meyerhofer, Sandra L. Register, Reina Sandoval, Leah Elshaug, Terry D. Martin, Floren Shivitz, Irwin Rosmarin, Amber Wagner, Donald Bonkosky, Wayne Baker, Jerdine Williams, Elie M. Mims, Shane Elshaug, Diana C. Cochran, Francine Mecca Jonas, Patricia L. Croak, Valerie Brennan, Roger Gray, Joan Arnold, Merle Miller, Jimmie Lee Baker, Larry Parrish, Kevin J. Spooner, MARIANNE DAUGHERTY, Jackie Wallace, Elizabeth Birmingham, Cathy Ryan, Sheryl Lawman, Theresa Brunori, Gerald G. Case, David Barton, Kanedra Shaw, Laurel Young, Eliel Cruz, Shawna Nelson, Lisa M. Kirk, Nicole Brooks, Linda Fields, Anna Risilia, Delores Thames, Gerald Adams, Roman Deville, Harold Summers, Robert Leroy Snyder, Eileen Paul, Norman Black, Cecil Brannan, Billy Marshall, Donna M. Lalk, Edward Rubin, Joanne L. Michaels, Ruth Richardson, Jan Perry, Richard Danley, Robert A. Gebhart, II, John T. Smith, Alan Maltin, Venetia Jarrett, David L. Mulcahy, Gerald Case, Giovanni Barone, Gregory Rothmere Hamlin, Theresa Morton, Ruth Ruiter, Nicholas Meyerhofer, Carol Setterdahl, Kaylene Brock Smith, Cheryl Lachance, Larry Smart, Constance Brannan, Evelyn Pacheco, Peggy Wilson, Larry Mason, Harry D Kinard, Doug Cannady, Jeannie E. Presler, Joseph E. Revak, Jr., Helen Morales, Celia E. Cox, Anthony Laron, Pamela Jerzak, Dawn Smith, Ruben Quiroz, Nancy Cunningham, Sharon Anderson, Marguerita C. McIntosh, Mary Heldenbrand, Linda Bratcher, John Payne, Herman Phillips, George Resendez, Janice M. Freebersyser, Ernest Cummings, Deborah Aldrich, Clarence L. Shively, Marina Shortley, Charles W. Buettenmuller, James Johnson, Paula DeWolf, Martha B. Schaufele, Donald Gobel, Cynthia Nydegger, Jacqueline Ann Stanley Tumey, Charles Schwartz, Genevieve Erin Wilkinson, Christine Minton, Nicole Trombley, Willie Seals, Leslie J. Weed, Terry Homer, Fritz Karl Schmidt, Stephen M. Fishel, David L. Ranson, Tandy Branham III, Jushonna Staten, Larry Hawkins, Marcola Powell, Brenda Shores, Stephen Warden, Barbara Leonard, Dale Susan Meltzer, Duncan Scott McIntosh, Happy Harrington, Donald Jones, Susan Reuffer, Winnie Johnson, Cynthia Gandy, Sharon McMahon, George A. Soderman, Arthur Bruce, Richard Willing, Richard Montreuil, Denise Kabisch, Ross Jennings, Gaetano Aiello, Catherine Allen, Sandra March, Mae Ellar Cowart, Robert J. Doebrick, Lois Thomas, Diane C. Sylvester, Ben Sanders, Frank Marin, Frances Sobek, James G. Smith, Stephen Spencer, Patricia Rook, Douglas Feld, Jerry Dennard, Jr., Shelley Garbes, Nancy Atherton, Wendy Lynne Snider, Peter Mancill, Edith Carnes, David R. Leitner, Sharon Ginger Kinard, Brenda Cochran, Billie Chlo Scheel, Richard Bentlin, Barbara Joann Smith, Celeste Johnson, Michael P. Smith, Robert Milliron, Donald Roberts, David F. Piper, Henry Gross, Paul Sajeski, John C. Jurgerson, Sarah P. Watkins, Michael Lee, Linda Miller, Alvera Wheeler, Cheryl K. Doebrick and Wanda Phillips
Defendant: Wright Medical Europe S.A., DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Harlan C Amstutz, MD, Gary Lynn Monson, Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, Does 1-10, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated, Terry L. Linkemer, John Doe Company, Steve Birnbaum and Harlan C Amstutz M D A Medical Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012md02329
Filed: February 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 2518 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Phyllis Brenneman 15-cv-04517) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
May 15, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2517 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to Plaintiff Allison Benson pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, each party to bear its own costs and fees. (bdb)
May 14, 2020 Filing 2517 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Allison Benson, 17-cv-02994) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2516 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stahl, Denise 1:15-cv-003589-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2515 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Brenda Wilson 1:14-cv-01518) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2514 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Richard and Susan Willing 1:14-cv-00199) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2513 STIPULATION of Dismissal (David A. Sylvester and Diane C. Sylvester l:14-cv-02901-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2512 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ana Smith 1:14-CV-2027) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2511 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Thomas Shortley and Marina Shortley 1:15-cv-01065-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2510 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Clarence L. Shively and Sharri S. Shively 1:17-cv-1051) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2509 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Fritz Karl Schmidt and Cecilia Schmidt 1:14-cv-01826-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2508 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marcola Powell 1:14-cv-03152-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2507 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stephen Nichols 1:16-cv-1050) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2506 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dale S. Meltzer 1:17-cv-01458) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2505 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jammie McCovery 1:15-cv-00422-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2504 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2503 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2502 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2501 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2500 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2499 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2498 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2497 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2496 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2495 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2494 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2493 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Lavern Pfeiffer 1:16-cv-03204) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2492 STIPULATION of Dismissal (France Carter 1:17-cv-02770) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2491 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Larry Parrish 1:14-cv-03021-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2490 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Eveyln Jones 1:14-cv-02343-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2489 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Wilda J. Harbison 1:14-cv-1064-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2488 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dorothy K. Barth and Ronald D. Barth 1:17-cv-04113-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2487 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Michael Woodworth and Valerie Woodworth 1:15-cv-03771-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2486 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Renee L. Spalding and Greg M. Spalding 1:14-cv-03112-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2485 STIPULATION of Dismissal (John T. Smith 1:17-cv-00037-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2484 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Roger Setterdahl and Carol Setterdahl 1:13-cv--3586-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2483 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Geoffrey B. Schofield and Sherry Schofield 1:17-cv-2492-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2482 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Irwin Rosmarin 1:13-cv-3101-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2481 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jeffrey D. Pyper and Linda Pyper 1:17-cv--03563-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2480 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Eileen and Jeffrey Paul 1:15-cv-03091-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2479 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Richard Paes 1:13-cv-0191) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2478 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joseph C. Ortega and Rita L. Ortega 1:15-cv-00547-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2477 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Norman Mills 1:14-cv-606) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2476 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Paul J. Marino 1:12-cv-03141-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2475 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Frances Harmon 1:14-cv-02336-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2474 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Roger Gray 1:16-cv-04045) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2473 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Edward J. Cherveny 1:13-cv-02558) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2472 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Steven Brown, Sr. 1:14-cv-03870) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2471 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Margreth C. Butterworth 1:16-cv-01011 WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2470 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Brian McCormick 1:14-cv-00228-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2469 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Mary McClarity 1:14-cv-01692-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2468 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Billy Marshall and Beverly Marshall 1:15-cv-00568-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2467 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Sheryl Lawman 1:14-cv-03689-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2466 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Theresa Hohenberger 1:13-cv-00295-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2465 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Milton DeLair and Patricia DeLair 1:16-cv-04146-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2464 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Theresa Brunori 1:14-cv-02242-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2463 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Michael Allen and Catherine Allen 1:14-cv-04050-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2462 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Darius Perez 1:13-cv-03885) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana) Modified on 2/25/2019 (sap).
February 20, 2019 Filing 2461 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jeanine & Gordon Thrall 1:12-cv-00664) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2460 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Delores Thames 1:13-cv-00777) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2459 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Shannon Strohm 1:15-cv-00111) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2458 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nancy & Bruce Stevenson 1:13-cv-03642) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2457 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Eric Snitkoff 1:12-cv-00612) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2456 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Peggy Rittenhouse 1:14-cv-03989) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2455 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Edward Oksienik & Lauren Vanston 1:17-cv-00932) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2454 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Seth and Cynthia Nydegger 1:17-cv-04114) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2453 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Beverly Morrison 1:14-cv-01227) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2452 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marilyn and Gary Monson 1:15-cv-02076) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2451 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Charles and Carol Hutchison 1:13-cv-01792) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2450 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Judith Hendrix 1:16-cv-01420) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2449 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Benjamin and Ann Fillmore 1:14-cv-1490) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2448 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Leilani Dow 1:14-cv-03274) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2447 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jace and Cheri Dees 1:11-cv-04415) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2446 STIPULATION of Dismissal (John Christy and Happy Harrington 1:13-cv-01370) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2445 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Danny Ray Allen 1:12-cv-01945) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2444 STIPULATION of Dismissal (William & Michelle Williams 1:17-cv-01438) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2443 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Beverly Wagner 1:13-cv-01714) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2442 STIPULATION of Dismissal (John Smith 1:14-cv-03066) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2441 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Melvin & Carol Meyer 1:14-cv-02148) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2440 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Darrell Hirsch 1:12-cv-03097) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2439 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nicole Frey 1:12-cv-03211) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2438 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Russell Meier 1:15-cv-01297) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2437 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Roger Gray 1:16-cv-04045) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2436 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Constance & Cecil Brannan 1:16-cv-04431) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2435 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Linda Maxine Fishel 1:12-cv-03081) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2434 STIPULATION of Dismissal (William & Rosemary Duvall 1:13-cv-02389) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2433 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Paula Kin o/b/o Nona Zwirnmann 1:13-cv-0193) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2432 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Parker Mead o/b/o Martin Mead 1:13-cv-0190) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2431 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ford Gordon Scalley 1:17-cv-02151) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2430 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Susan Reuffer 1:14-cv-00972) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2429 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Martin Metzger 1:14-cv-4111) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2428 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Debra Robinson o/b/o Donald Jones, Deceased) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2427 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joey & Theresa Daigle 1:13-cv-03732) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2426 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Cecil Burnett 1:14-cv-03360) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2425 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Peggy Wilson 1:14-cv-03581) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2424 STIPULATION of Dismissal (George Williamson 1:14-cv-00583) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2423 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Enid Williams 1:13-cv-0192) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2422 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dayl Waters 1:14-cv-02357) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2421 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stephen & Kelly Warden 1:14-cv-1135) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2420 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Frances & James Stagner 1:14-cv-00570) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2419 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Frances & William Sobek 1:12-cv-03083) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2418 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Wendy & Timothy Snider 1:14-cv-03720) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2417 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ellis & Sandra Register 1:16-cv-1576) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2416 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Galina Preobrazhenskaya 1:16-cv-02346) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2415 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jan & Robert Perry 1:17-cv-957) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2414 STIPULATION of Dismissal (John Payne 1:14-cv-01830) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2413 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Shirley Orsinelli 1:16-cv-04772) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2412 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Shawna Nelson 1:15-cv-02690) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2411 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marsha Moore 1:17-cv-3637) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2410 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James & Jane Miller 1:17-cv-1894) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2409 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joanne Michaels 1:16-cv-4478) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2408 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nicholas & Cheri Meyerhofer 1:13-cv-00137) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2407 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Olga & Michael Widom 1:12-cv-01233) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2406 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Lanny & Ruth Long 1:13-cv-02597) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2405 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joseph LaRue 1:14-cv-00379) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2404 STIPULATION of Dismissal (David & Dianna Kirkley 1:14-cv-00553) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2403 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Emma & Kevin Johnson 1:14-cv-03642) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2402 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Harry Jacobs 1:14-cv-02277) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2401 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Patricia & Bobby Horine 1:14-cv-04079) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2400 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Larry Hawkins 1:13-cv-0187) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2399 STIPULATION of Dismissal (William Haverly 1:16-cv-04773) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2398 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James & Kelley Hamilton 1:12-cv-03078) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2397 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Margaret & Phillip Groff 1:13-cv-03939) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2396 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Kevin & Wanda Greenfield 1:14-cv-03624) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2395 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Glen Graves 1:12-cv-2449) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2394 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Janet Duecy 1:15-cv-03052) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2393 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Lawrence & Kathleen Dougherty 1:14-cv-00833) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2392 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Crescencio & Patricia De Jesus 1:13-cv-00251 by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2391 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joann & Michael Daskivich 1:14-cv-00603) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2390 STIPULATION of Dismissal (William & Leslee Cook 1:14-cv-04068) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2389 STIPULATION of Dismissal (John Burger 1:12-cv-2306) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2388 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nicole Brooks 1:13-cv-01105) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2387 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Richard & Stephanie Bourdeaux 1:13-cv-4264) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2386 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ray & Sharon Anderson 1:12-cv-03049) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2385 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jacqueline Ames 1:12-cv-00626) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2384 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Harry Sakjas 1:12-cv-00628) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2383 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Anne Dickerson 1:12-cv-01553) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2382 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Kathy and Glendon Morales 1:15-cv-0873) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2381 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Giovanni and Carmela Barone 1:15-cv-00846) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 21, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2380 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Plaintiff Ray Z. Dissinger pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (sap)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2380 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ray Z. Dissinger 1:14-cv-03636) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (7)(2378) Stipulation of Dismissal of Michael Oseguera pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:17-cv-01762-WSD(jkl)
October 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (14)(2379) Stipulation of Dismissal of Donna M. Lalk pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:13-cv-02742-WSD(jkl)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2379 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Donna M. Lalk 1:13-cv-02742) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2378 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Michael Oseguera 1:17-cv-01762) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2377 NOTICE of Appearance of Cherisse Heidi A. Cleofe by Eleda Cohen, Michael Lee. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:12-cv-01140-WSD, 1:12-cv-02039-WSD(jkl)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2376 ORDER GRANTING #2375 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Terrence Smith terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT et al.(jkl)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2375 First MOTION to Withdraw Terrence Smith as Attorneyby Carmela Barone, Giovanni Barone. (Smith, Terrence)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2374 NOTICE by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated of Parties' Joint Designation of Contents of Records to be Remanded (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (2373 in 1:12-md-02329-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal, (10 in 1:14-cv-03378-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to Winfred & Angela Warren. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:14-cv-03378-WSD(jkl)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (11 in 1:14-cv-03707-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal, (2372 in 1:12-md-02329-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to George Soderman. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:14-cv-03707-WSD(jkl)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (9 in 1:14-cv-03532-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal, (2371 in 1:12-md-02329-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to Billie Scheel. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:14-cv-03532-WSD(jkl)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (2370 in 1:12-md-02329-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal, (11 in 1:13-cv-03194-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to Ruben & Patricia Quiroz. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:13-cv-03194-WSD(jkl)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (2369 in 1:12-md-02329-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal, (13 in 1:13-cv-00202-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to Mark Palmer. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:13-cv-00202-WSD(jkl)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (2368 in 1:12-md-02329-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal, (11 in 1:13-cv-01942-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to John Otey. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:13-cv-01942-WSD(jkl)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (20 in 1:12-cv-01542-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal, (2367 in 1:12-md-02329-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to Rita Nail. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:12-cv-01542-WSD(jkl)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (6 in 1:17-cv-01763-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal, (2366 in 1:12-md-02329-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to Sandra & Robert March. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:17-cv-01763-WSD(jkl)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (16 in 1:12-cv-02727-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal, (2365 in 1:12-md-02329-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to Lisa & David Ishmael. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:12-cv-02727-WSD(jkl)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (2364 in 1:12-md-02329-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal, (9 in 1:15-cv-02538-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to Terry Homer. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:15-cv-02538-WSD(jkl)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (2363 in 1:12-md-02329-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal, (6 in 1:15-cv-03534-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to Shirley Foliart. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:15-cv-03534-WSD(jkl)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (10 in 1:16-cv-04190-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal, (2362 in 1:12-md-02329-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to Nancy & Myron Dunn. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:16-cv-04190-WSD(jkl)
August 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (7 in 1:17-cv-01858-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal, (2361 in 1:12-md-02329-TWT) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) as to Douglas & Janet Anderson. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-TWT, 1:17-cv-01858-WSD(jkl)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2373 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Winfred & Angela Warren 1:14-cv-03378) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2372 STIPULATION of Dismissal (George Soderman 1:14-cv-03707) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2371 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Billie Scheel 1:14-cv-03532) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2370 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ruben & Patricia Quiroz 1:13-cv-03194) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2369 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Mark Palmer 1:13-cv-00202) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2368 STIPULATION of Dismissal (John Otey 1:13-cv-01942) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2367 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Rita Nail 1:12-cv-01542) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2366 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Sandra & Robert March 1:17-cv-01763) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2365 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Lisa & David Ishmael 1:12-cv-02727) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2364 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Terry Homer 1:15-cv-02538) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2363 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Shirley Foliart 1:15-cv-3534) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2362 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nancy & Myron Dunn 1:16-cv-04190) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2361 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Douglas & Janet Anderson 1:17-cv-01858) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
July 18, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2360 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Barbara Woodley, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bears its own costs. (jkl)
July 18, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2359 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Victor Miller and Linda Miller, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bears its own costs. (jkl)
July 18, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2358 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Mary Constantino, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bears its own costs. (jkl)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2360 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Barbara Woodley 1:14-cv-02570) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2359 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Victor & Linda Miller 1:15-cv-04519) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2358 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Mary Constantino 1:16-cv-02326) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
July 10, 2018 Per #2357 this case is Reassigned to Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:12-md-2329-TWT. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (ddm)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2357 ORDER of United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation reassigning this action the the Honorable Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (ddm)
June 27, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorneys not receiving an electronic copy re #2356 Order. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (ddm)
June 26, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2356 ORDER directing the Clerk to administratively close the master docket in this MDL. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 6/26/18. (ddm)
June 26, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2355 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Barry Mang, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00184-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 26, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2354 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Ruth Bader, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00294-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs and fees. (ddm)
June 26, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to all attorneys not receiving an electronic copy re [2351,2352,2353] Orders. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (ddm)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2355 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Barry Mang 1:13-cv-00184) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2354 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ruth Bader 1:13-cv-00294) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 25, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2350 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Jeffrey Butler, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-195-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 22, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to the JPML re #2352 Suggestion Concerning Remand. (bgt)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2353 ORDER directing that the Clerk administratively close the cases listed on Exhibit A to the Suggestion Concerning Remand #2352 . Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 6/22/18. (ddm)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2352 ORDER advising that pursuant to JPML Rule 10.1(b), the Court respectfully suggests that the JPML remand the cases identified in Exhibit A (attached to this Order) to the United States District Courts in which each case was filed and from which it was transferred. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 6/22/18. (ddm)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2351 OPINION AND ORDER directing that the cases identified on Exhibit A, attached to this Order, be transferred out of this MDL and remanded to the United States District Courts in which they were originally filed and from which they were transferred to the Court. The Clerk is directed to transfer the cases listed in Exhibit A to their respective District Courts. It is further ordered that the Clerk is directed to administratively close all cases listed in Exhibit B. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 6/22/18. (ddm)
June 22, 2018 Filing 2350 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jeffrey Butler 1:14-cv-00195) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2349 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Nancy Cunningham, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02431-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
June 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2348 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Paul & Nicole Trombley, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-971-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs and fees. (ddm)
June 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2347 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Lisa Owens, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03071-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2346 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Horace Dewayne Morgan, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03075-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2345 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Matthew & Vivian Neelley, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02243-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2344 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Benjamin Eisenberg, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03077-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own fees. (ddm)
June 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2343 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Marianne & Gerald Daugherty, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-02915-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2342 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Valerie Brennan, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00630-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs and fees. (ddm)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2349 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nancy Cunningham 1:13-cv-02431) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2348 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Paul & Nicole Trombley 1:14-cv-971) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2347 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Lisa Owens 1:12-cv-03071) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2346 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Horace Dewayne Morgan 1:12-cv-03075) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2345 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Matthew & Vivian Neelley 1:14-cv-02243) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2344 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Benjamin Eisenberg 1:12-cv-03077) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2343 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marianne & Gerald Daugherty 1:15-cv-02915) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2342 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Valerie Brennan 1:14-cv-00630) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 21, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2341 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to James Button, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-3355-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs and fees. (ddm)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2341 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by James Button. (Bachus, J.)
June 21, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2340 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Peter A. Hall, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-2149-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (ddm)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2340 STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by Peter A. Hall. (Filed in 1:14-cv-2149-WSD on 8/11/15.) (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2339 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to John Jurgerson, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02464-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2338 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Harry & Sharon Kinard, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00851-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2337 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Lisa Elston, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-00805-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs and attorney's fees. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2336 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Lisa Webb, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02448-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2335 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to William & Sarah Watkins, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02652-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2334 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Kermit Walker, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-2730-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2333 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Bradley Tufts, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-3585-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2332 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to David & Robin True, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-04128-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2331 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Jerry Trimble, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-01513-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2330 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Carol Teig, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-03482-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2329 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to James Stogner, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-0837-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2328 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Helen & Gerald Soda, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-1231-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2327 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Terry & Dawn Smith, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03641-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2326 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Charles Edwin Shirko, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00177-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2325 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Cathy Ryan, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-04308-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2324 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to John Roberts, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02592-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2323 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Gene & Jeannie Presler, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00797-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2322 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Christa Poindexter, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-0874-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2321 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Christine & Michael Minton, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-00615-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2320 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Sharon & James Covey f/k/a Sharon Ming, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02391-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2319 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Joan & David Leitner, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03104-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2318 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Cheryl LaChance, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03764-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2317 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Denise Kabisch, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01371-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2316 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Judith Ann Hildebrand, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00366-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2315 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Reginald & June Harrison, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-01228-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2314 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Craig & Janice Freebersyser, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-1804-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2313 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Noreen & Larry Dogs, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-04255-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2312 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Twyla Clarke, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00235-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2311 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Roger & Mary Burgart, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-01172-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2310 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Willa Allen, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00729-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2309 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Agnes Gobel, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02641-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs and fees. (ddm)
June 20, 2018 Filing 2339 STIPULATION of Dismissal (John Jurgerson 1:13-cv-02464) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2308 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to George David Smith, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00780-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2307 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to James & Dorothy Ann Wilson, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-03596-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs and fees. (ddm)
June 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2306 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Evelyn Lois Such, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-04430-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2305 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Lesia Smith, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-01313-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs and fees. (ddm)
June 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2304 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Marvin & Marguerita McIntosh, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-2147-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs and fees. (ddm)
June 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2303 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Terry D. Martin, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03768-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2302 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to James & Celeste Johnson, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-3769-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2338 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Harry & Sharon Kinard 1:14-cv-00851) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2301 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Royal Lee Hines, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00381-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
June 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2300 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Hiram & Helen Glenn, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03722-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
June 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2299 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Authelia Gallman, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-01018-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2337 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Lisa Elston 1:12-cv-00805) by Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2336 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Lisa Webb 1:14-cv-02448) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2335 STIPULATION of Dismissal (William & Sarah Watkins 1:13-cv-02652) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2334 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Kermit Walker 1:14-cv-2730) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2333 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Bradley Tufts 1:13-cv-3585) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2332 STIPULATION of Dismissal (David & Robin True 1:13-cv-04128) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2331 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jerry Trimble 1:14-cv-01513) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2330 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Carol Teig 1:14-cv-03482) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2329 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James Stogner 1:13-cv-0837) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2328 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Helen & Gerald Soda 1:14-cv-1231) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2327 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Terry & Dawn Smith 1:13-cv-03641) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2326 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Charles Edwin Shirko 1:15-cv-00177) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2325 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Cathy Ryan 1:12-cv-04308) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2324 STIPULATION of Dismissal (John Roberts 1:14-cv-02592) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2323 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Gene & Jeannie Presler 1:13-cv-00797) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2322 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Christa Poindexter 1:15-cv-0874) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2321 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Christine & Michael Minton 1:12-cv-00615) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2320 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Sharon & James Covey f/k/a Sharon Ming 1:13-cv-02391) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2319 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joan & David Leitner 1:12-cv-03104) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2318 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Cheryl LaChance 1:13-cv-03764) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2317 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Denise Kabisch 1:13-cv-01371) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2316 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Judith Ann Hildebrand 1:14-cv-00366) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2315 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Reginald & June Harrison 1:15-cv-01228) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2314 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Craig & Janice Freebersyser 1:16-cv-1804) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2313 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Noreen & Larry Dogs 1:12-cv-04255) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2312 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Twyla Clarke 1:13-cv-00235) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2311 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Roger & Mary Burgart 1:14-cv-01172) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2310 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Willa Allen 1:13-cv-00729) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2309 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Agnes Gobel 1:13-cv-02641) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2298 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Michael Feinberg, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-03004-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs. (ddm)
June 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2297 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Doris Jean Brown, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02240-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs and fee. (ddm)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2308 STIPULATION of Dismissal (George David Smith 1:14-cv-00780) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2307 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James & Dorothy Ann Wilson 1:14-cv-03596) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2306 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Evelyn Lois Such 1:16-cv-04430) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2305 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Lesia Smith 1:14-cv-01313) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2304 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marvin & Marguerita McIntosh 1:14-cv-2147) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2303 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Terry D. Martin 1:12-cv-03768) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2302 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James & Celeste Johnson 1:13-cv-3769) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2301 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Royal Lee Hines 1:14-cv-00381) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2300 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Hiram & Helen Glenn 1:13-cv-03722) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2299 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Authelia Gallman 1:14-cv-01018) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2298 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Michael Feinberg 1:15-cv-03004) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2297 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Doris Jean Brown 1:14-cv-02240) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2295 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Marianne & Gerald Daugherty 1:15-cv-03403-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2294 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Dierdre Williamson, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00082-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2293 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Leslie & Mary Weed, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02417-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2292 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to John & Jacquelyn Wallace, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-2320-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2291 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Joyce Tebbe, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03888-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2290 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Victor & Susan Smith, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03108-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2289 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to James & Barbara Joann Smith, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02276-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2288 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Steven L. Scott, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-01325-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2287 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Linda H. Scott, Civil Action Number 1:2-cv-04302-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2286 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Lequata & William Montgomery, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-01816-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2285 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Phyllis Miller, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00513-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2284 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Katherine McClellan, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03117-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2283 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Robert Marchlewicz, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-00849-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2282 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Nancy L. Koul, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01627-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2281 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Tamara & Larry Koenig, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-04033-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2280 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Mauryce Kennon, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-02453-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2279 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Norma Lucille Johnson, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02395-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2278 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Kathleen & Eric Johnson, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01106-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2277 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Patricia & Timothy Hinrichs, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-3609-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2276 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Mary Heldenbrand, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00207-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2275 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Earl & Linda Hebert, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-2583-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2274 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Harold & Sandra Graves, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-00693-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2273 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to John Goromboly, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-04328-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2272 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Nancy & William Gleim, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00634-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2271 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Pauline & Robert Finstad, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-3595-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2269 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Dianna & Barry Cochran, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-3699-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2268 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Dorothy & Arthur Bruce, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02997-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2267 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Steven & Sherry Bacovsky, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00268-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2266 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Marjorie & Gaetano Aiello, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-02739-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2296 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to James E and Linda F. Fields, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-3205-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 7, 2018 Filing 2296 STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii (James E and Linda F. Fields, 1:14-cv-3205) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
June 6, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2265 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to David Dockerty, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00588-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 6, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2264 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to James & Diona Davis, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-01519-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
June 6, 2018 Filing 2295 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marianne & Gerald Daugherty 1:15-cv-03403) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2294 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dierdre Williamson 1:13-cv-00082) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2293 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Leslie & Mary Weed 1:14-cv-02417) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2292 STIPULATION of Dismissal (John & Jacquelyn Wallace 1:12-cv-2320) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2291 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joyce Tebbe 1:13-cv-03888) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2290 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Victor & Susan Smith 1:12-cv-03108) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2289 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James & Barbara Joann Smith 1:14-cv-02276) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2288 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Steven L. Scott 1:14-cv-01325) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2287 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Linda H. Scott 1:2-cv-04302) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2286 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Lequata & William Montgomery 1:15-cv-01816) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2285 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Phyllis Miller 1:14-cv-00513) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2284 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Katherine McClellan 1:12-cv-03117) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2283 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Robert Marchlewicz 1:16-cv-00849) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2282 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nancy L. Koul 1:13-cv-01627) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2281 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Tamara & Larry Koenig 1:15-cv-04033) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2280 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Mauryce Kennon 1:12-cv-02453) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2279 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Norma Lucille Johnson 1:13-cv-02395) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2278 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Kathleen & Eric Johnson 1:13-cv-01106) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2277 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Patricia & Timothy Hinrichs 1:13-cv-3609) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2276 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Mary Heldenbrand 1:13-cv-00207) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2275 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Earl & Linda Hebert 1:15-cv-2583) by Wright Medical Europe S.A., Wright Medical Group Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2274 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Harold & Sandra Graves 1:12-cv-00693) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2273 STIPULATION of Dismissal (John Goromboly 1:15-cv-04328) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2272 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nancy & William Gleim 1:15-cv-00634) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2271 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Pauline & Robert Finstad 1:13-cv-3595) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2270 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Glynn Lee and Lynn Zeigler 1:14-cv-374) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana) Modified on 6/7/2018 (ddm).
June 5, 2018 Filing 2269 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dianna & Barry Cochran 1:14-cv-3699) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2268 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dorothy & Arthur Bruce 1:13-cv-02997) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2267 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Steven & Sherry Bacovsky 1:14-cv-00268) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2266 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marjorie & Gaetano Aiello 1:12-cv-02739) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2265 STIPULATION of Dismissal (David Dockerty 1:14-cv-00588) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2264 STIPULATION of Dismissal James & Diona Davis 1:14-cv-01519) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
May 30, 2018 NOTICE CANCELLING HEARING (by docket entry only): The teleconference set for 5/31/2018 at 9:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:12-cv-01305-WSD (bgt)
May 24, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2263 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Farhad Shatti, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03097-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
May 24, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2262 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Betty & Phillip Moore, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03765-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
May 24, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2261 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Monica & Kenneth Pribanic, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01111-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
May 24, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2260 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Gerald & Joan Case, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02445-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
May 24, 2018 Filing 2263 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Farhad Shatti 1:13-cv-03097) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
May 24, 2018 Filing 2262 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Betty & Phillip Moore 1:13-cv-03765) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
May 24, 2018 Filing 2261 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Monica & Kenneth Pribanic 1:13-cv-01111) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
May 24, 2018 Filing 2260 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Gerald & Joan Case 1:14-cv-02445) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2259 ORDER regarding the case of Cowart v Wright Medical Technology, Inc., et al., Civil Action 1:12-cv-1305-WSD scheduling a telephonic status conference for May 31, 2018, at 9:30 am, to discuss the status of this litigation and the processing of it with respect to the conclusion of the multi-district litigation. All counsel in the Case, including Ms. Cowart's individual counsel, are required to participate in the teleconference. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 5/21/18. (ddm)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2258 ORDER regarding the case of Cowart v Wright Medical Technology, Inc., et al., Civil Action 1:12-cv-1305-WSD scheduling an in-chambers status conference for May 21, 2018, at 11:00 am, in Room 1721 to discuss the status of this litigation and the processing of it with respect to the conclusion of the multi-district litigation. All counsel in the Case, including Ms. Cowart's individual counsel, are required to attend the status conference. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 5/15/18. (ddm)
May 3, 2018 Filing 2257 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr.: Status Conference held in Chambers on 5/3/2018. (Court Reporter Nicholas A. Marrone)(ddm)
May 2, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2256 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Nicole Reed-Olsen and Rod Olsen, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-2101-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
May 2, 2018 Filing 2256 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nicole Reed-Olsen and Rod Olsen 1:12-cv-2101) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
April 16, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2255 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Steven Wacker, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01808-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
April 16, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2254 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to James Tice, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-00613-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
April 16, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2253 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Michael P. Smith, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03249-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
April 16, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2252 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to George & Linda Mattison, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-4064-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
April 16, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2251 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Pamela & Richard Jerzak, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-1050-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
April 16, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2250 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to James Igoe, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-2405-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
April 16, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2249 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Julie Hobert, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-04176-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
April 16, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2248 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Cathleen Claussenius, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-00614-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2255 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Steven Wacker 1:13-cv-01808) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2254 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James Tice 1:12-cv-00613) by Wright Medical Europe S.A., Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2253 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Michael P. Smith 1:13-cv-03249) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2252 STIPULATION of Dismissal (George & Linda Mattison 1:16-cv-4064) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2251 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Pamela & Richard Jerzak 1:13-cv-1050) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2250 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James Igoe 1:12-cv-2405) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2249 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Julie Hobert 1:12-cv-04176) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2248 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Cathleen Claussenius 1:12-cv-00614) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
April 3, 2018 Filing 2247 SHORT FORM ANSWER to #1982 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Deborah Mancill and Peter Mancill (17-cv-03705-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated.(Ash, Dana) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 23, 2018 Clerks Certificate of Mailing to all attorneys not receiving electronic notification re [2245,2246] Orders. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (ddm)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2246 Qualified Protective Order as to Medicaid, Other Governmental Healthcare Programs and Private Health Insurance Plans. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/22/18. (ddm)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2245 Oualified Protective Order as to Medicare Secondary Payer. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/22/18. (ddm)
March 22, 2018 Filing 2244 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Thomas J. Preuss replacing attorney Thomas J. Preuss. (Preuss, Thomas)
March 22, 2018 Filing 2243 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Thomas J. Preuss replacing attorney Thomas J. Preuss. (Preuss, Thomas)
March 16, 2018 Filing 2242 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Kelly McLemore on behalf of James Miller, Jane Miller (McLemore, Ryan)
March 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2241 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Craig & Genevieve Wilkinson, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-1196-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
March 13, 2018 Filing 2241 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Craig & Genevieve Wilkinson 1:12-cv-1196) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2240 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Michael Ragland, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-3191-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
March 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2239 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Megan Mork, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-0861-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
March 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2238 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Kim Manning & Steven Berkson, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01279-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
March 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2237 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Robert & Diane Gebhart, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-04304-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
March 9, 2018 Filing 2240 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Michael Ragland 1:13-cv-3191) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 9, 2018 Filing 2239 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Megan Mork 1:13-cv-0861) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 9, 2018 Filing 2238 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Kim Manning & Steven Berkson 1:13-cv-01279) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 9, 2018 Filing 2237 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Robert & Diane Gebhart 1:12-cv-04304) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 8, 2018 Filing 2236 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel's First Updated Status Report Concerning Cases Requiring Remand or Dismissal by Michael Abegg, Dennis Abts, Cathy Adams, Gerald Adams, Michael Shane Adams, Gaetano Aiello, Marjorie Aiello, David Albright, Elaine Albright, Deborah Aldrich, James Aldrich, Barbara A. Alexander, Johnnie Alexander, Willie Alexander, Catherine Allen, Danny Ray Allen, Michael XX Allen, Michael Allen, Michael Allen, Willa J. Allen, Samuel Ambler, Jacqueline Ames, Colleen Amirr, Joseph Amirr, Douglas F. Anderson, Janet B. Anderson, Ray Anderson, Sharon Anderson, Douglas Armstrong, Tammi Armstrong, Gene Arnold, Harvey Arnold, Joan Arnold, Karen Arnold, Larry Arnold, Judith Arvoy, Nancy Atherton, Lawrence Bachelder, Sherri Bacovsky, Steven J. Bacovsky, Ruth M. Bader, Shalonda Bailey, Jimmie Lee Baker, Laurel Baker, Mary Baker, Wayne Baker, Corey S. Barnard, Dorothy Jean Barnhouse, Otto Herbert Barnhouse, Carmela Barone, Giovanni Barone, Gail Bartels, John Bartels, Dorothy K. Barth, Ronald D. Barth, David Barton, Teresa Barwick, Allison Benson, Karyn Bentlin, Richard Bentlin, Heather A. Bianciotto, Gina Bianckino, Steven Birkson, Elizabeth Birmingham, Thomas E. Birmingham, Angelika Black, Norman Black, Pauline Blair, Karen Block, Hilda Blount, Bonnie Sue Bogert, Richard E. Bogert, David L. Bonham, Donald Bonkosky, John Borg, Terry Borg, Richard Robert Bourdeaux, Stephanie Bourdeaux, Donald Bowers, Patricia Bowers, Fred Braasch, Michaela Braasch, Randy Scott Bradshaw, Ray Bradshaw, Jr, Vickie Branham, Tandy Branham III, Cecil Brannan, Constance Brannan, Linda Bratcher, Larry A. Breeze, Valerie Brennan, Phyllis Brenneman, Hope Briggs, Robert L. Brock, Christine Catherine Brooks, Nicole Brooks, Doris Jean Brown, Joseph Brown, Letha Brown, Steven Brown, Sr, Arthur Bruce, Dorothy Bruce, Theresa Brunori, Stephen F. Brynelson, Janell Foster Bryson, Sheldon Buch, Charles W. Buettenmuller, Mary Burgart, Roger Burgart, John E. Burger, Cecil Burnett, David Burns, Saundra Burns, Jeffery Butler, Jeffrey E. Butler, Margreth C. Butterworth, James Button, Tessa Cain, William Cain, James Calvert, Sadie Calvert, Denise Calzada, John Campbell, Doug Cannady, Gayle Cannady, Nicholas Carl, Denise Carnegie, Sammy Carnegie, Edith Carnes, Frances Carter, Wanda Carter, Gerald G. Case, Gerald Case, Joann Case, Susan Case, Edward J. Cherveny, Annette Childs, Robert Lee Chisolm, Dennis Christensen, Florence Christensen, Gene Christiansen, Robyn Christiansen, John Christy, William Chrostowski, Tina Marie Cien, Joe A. Cienfuegos, Jr, Twyla Clarke, France Clausen, Mark A. Clausen, Cathleen Claussenius, Barry A. Cochran, Brenda Cochran, David Cochran, Diana C. Cochran, Eleda Cohen, Phyllis Coleman, Otis Collier, Mary Constantino, Leslee Cook, William Earl Cook, Jr, Joe Council, Mae Ellar Cowart, Billy Eugene Cox, Celia E. Cox, Patricia L. Croak, Richard B. Croak, Helen Crocker-Pope, Steven Cross, Carlodina J. Cruz, Eliel Cruz, Ernest Cummings, Kathryn Cummings, Nancy Cunningham, Samantha Curran, Dave Currens, Kay Currens, Margaret Curtis, GERALD DAUGHERTY, MARIANNE DAUGHERTY, Joey Daigle, Brian K. Dameron, Jo Dawn Danley, Richard Danley, Joann Daskivich, Michael Daskivich, Diona Davis, Ginger Davis, James E. Davis, Denise Davis-Reno, Brian M. Day, Patricia M. Day, Linda DeHoet, Cresencio DeJesus, Patricia DeJesus, Milton DeLair, Patricia DeLair, John R. DeWolf, Paula DeWolf, Cheri Dees, Jace Dees, Francine Degenhardt, Thomas Degenhardt, Jerry Dennard, Jr, Mary Destouet, Diane Deville, Roman Deville, Anne L. Dickerson, J'Renee Dickson, Lisa Diercksen, Ronald Diercksen, Ray Z. Dissinger, David Dockerty, Larry R. Dodd, Cheryl K. Doebrick, Robert J. Doebrick, Larry C. Dogs, Noreen M. Dogs, Nancy Dolensek, Kathleen Dougherty, Lawrence Dougherty, Jr, Katherine Douglas, Robert Douglas, Leilani Dow, Dennis M. Doyle, Kathleen A. Doyle, Janet E. Duecy, Jane Duke, Myron Dunn, Nancy Dunn, Rosemary Duvall, William Duvall, Doris Edelman, Sheldon Edelman, Ray Eigenbrode, Benjamin Eisenberg, Marilyn Eisenberg, Larita Elias, Mervin Elias, Kathy L. Eliason, Arthur E. Elliott, Leah Elshaug, Shane Elshaug, Lisa Elston, Michael Feinberg, Douglas Feld, Nancie Feld, June Feldman, Fred W. Fewell, Martha J. Fewell, James Fields, Linda Fields, Alberto Fierro, Ann Fillmore, Ben Fillmore, Amy Fine, Steven Fine, Pauline Finstad, Robert Finstad, Linda M. Fishel, Stephen M. Fishel, Shirley Fisher, Linda K. Floyd, Shirley Foliart, Margie J. Fredrickson, Craig J. Freebersyser, Janice M. Freebersyser, Jerry French, Nicole M. Frey, Donald Friend, Gina Friend, George Fry, Jr, Rosemary Fry, Thomas Gadbois, Authelia Gallman, Bertha Gamble, Gary Gamble, Cynthia Gandy, Patrick Gandy, Shelley Garbes, James Henry Garcia, Diane Gebhart, Robert A. Gebhart, II, Robert Giacometti, Sally Giacometti, Deborah L. Giasson, Guy P. Giasson, Michael Glassco, Nancy A. Gleim, William R. Gleim, Hiram Glenn, Jr, Donald Gobel, John Goromboly, Glen Graves, Harold L. Graves, Sandra R. Graves, Roger Gray, Kevin L. Greenfield, Wanda Greenfield, Janne C. Gregoire, Richard Gregoire, Lisa Griego, Mark Griffin, Margaret Groff, Phillip Groff, Henry Gross, Mary Grossbier, Gerald Gubanski, Fabian Guillen, Janet M. Gunter, Betty L. Hall, Dianne A. Hall, Janice L. Hall, Peter A. Hall, Raymond E. Hall, James Carter Hamilton, Kelley Renee Hamilton, Gregory Rothmere Hamlin, Mark Hammond, Cherie M. Hanks, Wilda J. Harbison, Dorothy J. Hardy, Richard C. Hardy, Frances Harmon, Happy Harrington, James Harris, June Harrison, Reginald Harrison, Paula Hartwell, Thomas Harward, Valerie Harward, Valerie Hasely, Jean B. Hastings, Robert L. Hastings, William Haverly, Larry Hawkins, Earl J. Hebert, Linda Hebert, Mary Heldenbrand, Harold Henderson, Jr, Judith A. Hendrix, Linda R. Hepner, David Herold, Kathleen Herold, Eric Herzog, Judith Ann Hildebrand, Ricky Hill, Royal Lee Hines, Patricia Hinrichs, Timothy Hinrichs, Darrell Hirsch, Julie Hobert, Irwin Hoffman, Jacqueline A. Hoffman, Theresa J. Hohenberger, Gloria Hollenbeck, James V. Holmes, Percy Holmes, Terry Homer, Henry R. Hooker, Naomi E. Hooker, Mark Hoover, Nancy Hoover, Bobby Gene Horine, Patricia Diane Horine, Jimmy Horton, Helen R. Hribar, Lyle Huisinga, Tracey Huisinga, Charles Edward Hundt, Carol Hutchinson, Charles Hutchinson, Linda Hyde, James Igoe, David Ishmael, Lisa Ishmael, Donna Jackson, Harry Jacobs, Danny L. James, Sr, Gail Jansen, David Jaramillo, Coleman Jarrett, Paula Jarrett, Venetia Jarrett, Patricia Jeffers, Marlene A. Jennings, Ross Jennings, James Jensen, Pamela Jerzak, Anthony Johnson, Celeste Johnson, Emma Jean Johnson, Eric C. Johnson, James Johnson, Karen J. Johnson, Kathleen Minadeo Johnson, Kathy Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Nancy C. Johnson, Norma Johnson, Sharon M. Johnson, Winnie Johnson, Jerry L. Johnson, Sr, Francine Mecca Jonas, Ronald Jonas, Donald Jones, Evelyn Jones, Frederick W. Jones, John C. Jurgerson, Denise Kabisch, Marilyn Katz, Carole Kearn, Nikki Kellogg, William Kellogg, Mauryce Kennon, Ronald Kimsey, Harry D Kinard, Sharon Ginger Kinard, Naomi Kingery, Roger Kingery, Taleeea Isaphine Kinsey, Lisa M. Kirk, David Kirkley, Dianna Kirkley, Larry Koenig, Tamara Koenig, Debra Korszeniewski, Nancy L. Koul, Melvin Kruse, Joseph A. LaRue, Joseph Abel LaRue, Jr, Cheryl Lachance, Donna M. Lalk, Jeannie Lansdell, Perry Lansdell, Anthony Laron, Diane Lattimore, David Lavares, Sheryl Lawman, Michael Lee, David R. Leitner, Joan M. Leitner, Dolores Lentine, Robert Lentine, Barbara Leonard, Franklin Lester, Lanny Long, Ruth Ann Long, Tamara Loosle, Edna Lopez, Joe F. Lopez, Roy Gene Lyles, Kathy Lyons, Richard Lyons, Bruce MacGurn, Cathy MacGurn, Andrew Maizner, Alan Maltin, Connie Maltin, Deborah Mancill, Peter Mancill, Barry Mang, Kim Elizabeth Manning, Sandra March, Robert Marchlewicz, Frank Marin, Paul Marino, Paul J. Marino, Judith Marketos, Beverly Marshall, Billy Marshall, Olga L. Martin, Terry D. Martin, Kristine M. Mason, Larry Mason, George Mattison, Linda Mattison, Mary McClarity, Katherine M. McClellan, Vera McClelland, Brian McCormick, Dorothea McCormick, S. Michael McCormick, Jammie McCovery, Shirley Ann McCright, Lester E. McDowell, Kathy McGee, Anita McGrady, Michael McGrady, D. Scott McIntosh, Joshua McIntosh, Marguerita C. McIntosh, Marvin R. McIntosh, Sharon McMahon(as Executor of the Estate of Rosemary Maser, deceased), Sharon McMahon(as Executor of the Estate of Rosemary Maser, deceased,), James McQuerry, Martin Mead, Russell Meier, Mary Ann Meiling, Phillip Meiling, Dale Susan Meltzer, William Allan Menne, Martin Metzger, Hendrick Meuzelaar, Pieternella Meuzelaar, Carol Sue Meyer, Melvin Ray Meyer, Cheri A. Meyerhofer, Nicholas Meyerhofer, Terry Meza, Joanne L. Michaels, Karen Michaels, Evelyn Miller, James Miller, Jane Miller, Kenneth Miller, Linda Miller, Merle Miller, Phyllis Susan Miller, Victor Miller, Robert Milliron, Norman Mills, Yefim Milter, Elie M. Mims, Norma C. Mims, John Ming, Sharon Ming, Christine Minton, Michael Minton, Gregory Moen, Marilyn R. Monson, Lequata Montgomery, William Montgomery, Richard Montreuil, Angelia Moore, Betty Moore, Marsha Moore, Phillip Ray Moore, Alan M. Morales, Helen Morales, Kathy Morales, Horace Dewayne Morgan, Sharlene Morgan, Megan Mork, Beverly Morrison, Kristin A. Morrow, Theresa Morton, Geraldine Mouyios, Naysa Mowell, William Mowell, David L. Mulcahy, Gabriella Mulcahy, Jennifer Murin, Andlle Naeter, Rita Nail, Anthony Neal, Mathew Neelley, Vivian Neelley, Elizabeth S. Neily, Shawna Nelson, Deborah Newton, Stephen Nichols, Mark Ronald Nord, Cynthia Nydegger, Seth Nydegger, Henry Earl O'Cain, Dan Offrell, Edward Oksienik, Rod Olsen, Muriel Olson, Shirley Orsinelli, Joseph C. Ortega, Rita L. Ortega, Michael Oseguera, John Otey, James Dirk Owens, Lisa Owens, Evelyn Pacheco, Richard Paes, Charles Palmer, Marilyn M. Palmer, Mark Palmer, Don Palow, Sharron Palow, Larry Parrish, Bobbie Patterson, Eileen Paul, Jeffrey Paul, John Payne, Susan Peil, Darius Perez, Frances C. Perkins, Jan Perry, Robert Perry, Darren Peterson, Pamela Peterson, Alexander Petrovic, Vivian Petrovic, Lavern Pfeiffer, Herman Phillips, Wanda Phillips, Christine Piper, David F. Piper, Tolling Agreement Plaintiffs, Charles Plungis,
March 6, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2234 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Todd Smith, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-002547-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
March 6, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2233 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Otis Collier, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-02164-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own fees and costs. (ddm)
March 6, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2235 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Diana Taylor, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-00767-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
March 6, 2018 Filing 2235 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Diana Taylor 1:12-cv-00767) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 6, 2018 Filing 2234 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Todd Smith 1:16-cv-002547) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 6, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2232 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Robert Lee Chisolm, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-03655-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
March 6, 2018 Filing 2233 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Otis Collier 1:15-cv-02164) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 6, 2018 Filing 2232 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Robert Lee Chisolm 1:14-cv-03655) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
March 5, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2231 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Helen R. Hribar, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-2467-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (ddm)
March 5, 2018 Filing 2231 STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by Helen R. Hribar. (Civil Action 1:14-cv-2467-WSD) (ddm)
March 5, 2018 Filing 2230 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Qualified Protective Orders to Facilitate Lien Administration for Settlement by Michael Abegg, Dennis Abts, Cathy Adams, Gerald Adams, Michael Shane Adams, Gaetano Aiello, Marjorie Aiello, David Albright, Elaine Albright, Deborah Aldrich, James Aldrich, Barbara A. Alexander, Johnnie Alexander, Willie Alexander, Catherine Allen, Danny Ray Allen, Michael XX Allen, Michael Allen, Michael Allen, Willa J. Allen, Samuel Ambler, Jacqueline Ames, Colleen Amirr, Joseph Amirr, Douglas F. Anderson, Janet B. Anderson, Ray Anderson, Sharon Anderson, Douglas Armstrong, Tammi Armstrong, Gene Arnold, Harvey Arnold, Joan Arnold, Karen Arnold, Larry Arnold, Judith Arvoy, Nancy Atherton, Lawrence Bachelder, Sherri Bacovsky, Steven J. Bacovsky, Ruth M. Bader, Shalonda Bailey, Jimmie Lee Baker, Laurel Baker, Mary Baker, Wayne Baker, Corey S. Barnard, Dorothy Jean Barnhouse, Otto Herbert Barnhouse, Carmela Barone, Giovanni Barone, Gail Bartels, John Bartels, Dorothy K. Barth, Ronald D. Barth, David Barton, Teresa Barwick, Allison Benson, Karyn Bentlin, Richard Bentlin, Heather A. Bianciotto, Gina Bianckino, Steven Birkson, Elizabeth Birmingham, Thomas E. Birmingham, Angelika Black, Norman Black, Pauline Blair, Karen Block, Hilda Blount, Bonnie Sue Bogert, Richard E. Bogert, David L. Bonham, Donald Bonkosky, John Borg, Terry Borg, Richard Robert Bourdeaux, Stephanie Bourdeaux, Donald Bowers, Patricia Bowers, Fred Braasch, Michaela Braasch, Randy Scott Bradshaw, Ray Bradshaw, Jr, Vickie Branham, Tandy Branham III, Cecil Brannan, Constance Brannan, Linda Bratcher, Larry A. Breeze, Valerie Brennan, Phyllis Brenneman, Hope Briggs, Robert L. Brock, Christine Catherine Brooks, Nicole Brooks, Doris Jean Brown, Joseph Brown, Letha Brown, Steven Brown, Sr, Arthur Bruce, Dorothy Bruce, Theresa Brunori, Stephen F. Brynelson, Janell Foster Bryson, Sheldon Buch, Charles W. Buettenmuller, Mary Burgart, Roger Burgart, John E. Burger, Cecil Burnett, David Burns, Saundra Burns, Jeffery Butler, Jeffrey E. Butler, Margreth C. Butterworth, James Button, Tessa Cain, William Cain, James Calvert, Sadie Calvert, Denise Calzada, John Campbell, Doug Cannady, Gayle Cannady, Nicholas Carl, Denise Carnegie, Sammy Carnegie, Edith Carnes, Frances Carter, Wanda Carter, Gerald G. Case, Gerald Case, Joann Case, Susan Case, Edward J. Cherveny, Annette Childs, Robert Lee Chisolm, Dennis Christensen, Florence Christensen, Gene Christiansen, Robyn Christiansen, John Christy, William Chrostowski, Tina Marie Cien, Joe A. Cienfuegos, Jr, Twyla Clarke, France Clausen, Mark A. Clausen, Cathleen Claussenius, Barry A. Cochran, Brenda Cochran, David Cochran, Diana C. Cochran, Eleda Cohen, Phyllis Coleman, Otis Collier, Mary Constantino, Leslee Cook, William Earl Cook, Jr, Joe Council, Mae Ellar Cowart, Billy Eugene Cox, Celia E. Cox, Patricia L. Croak, Richard B. Croak, Helen Crocker-Pope, Steven Cross, Carlodina J. Cruz, Eliel Cruz, Ernest Cummings, Kathryn Cummings, Nancy Cunningham, Samantha Curran, Dave Currens, Kay Currens, Margaret Curtis, GERALD DAUGHERTY, MARIANNE DAUGHERTY, Joey Daigle, Brian K. Dameron, Jo Dawn Danley, Richard Danley, Joann Daskivich, Michael Daskivich, Diona Davis, Ginger Davis, James E. Davis, Denise Davis-Reno, Brian M. Day, Patricia M. Day, Linda DeHoet, Cresencio DeJesus, Patricia DeJesus, Milton DeLair, Patricia DeLair, John R. DeWolf, Paula DeWolf, Cheri Dees, Jace Dees, Francine Degenhardt, Thomas Degenhardt, Jerry Dennard, Jr, Mary Destouet, Diane Deville, Roman Deville, Anne L. Dickerson, J'Renee Dickson, Lisa Diercksen, Ronald Diercksen, Ray Z. Dissinger, David Dockerty, Larry R. Dodd, Cheryl K. Doebrick, Robert J. Doebrick, Larry C. Dogs, Noreen M. Dogs, Nancy Dolensek, Kathleen Dougherty, Lawrence Dougherty, Jr, Katherine Douglas, Robert Douglas, Leilani Dow, Dennis M. Doyle, Kathleen A. Doyle, Janet E. Duecy, Jane Duke, Myron Dunn, Nancy Dunn, Rosemary Duvall, William Duvall, Doris Edelman, Sheldon Edelman, Ray Eigenbrode, Benjamin Eisenberg, Marilyn Eisenberg, Larita Elias, Mervin Elias, Kathy L. Eliason, Arthur E. Elliott, Leah Elshaug, Shane Elshaug, Lisa Elston, Michael Feinberg, Douglas Feld, Nancie Feld, June Feldman, Fred W. Fewell, Martha J. Fewell, James Fields, Linda Fields, Alberto Fierro, Ann Fillmore, Ben Fillmore, Amy Fine, Steven Fine, Pauline Finstad, Robert Finstad, Linda M. Fishel, Stephen M. Fishel, Shirley Fisher, Linda K. Floyd, Shirley Foliart, Shirley Foliart, Margie J. Fredrickson, Craig J. Freebersyser, Janice M. Freebersyser, Jerry French, Nicole M. Frey, Donald Friend, Gina Friend, George Fry, Jr, Rosemary Fry, Thomas Gadbois, Authelia Gallman, Bertha Gamble, Gary Gamble, Cynthia Gandy, Patrick Gandy, Shelley Garbes, James Henry Garcia, Diane Gebhart, Robert A. Gebhart, II, Robert Giacometti, Sally Giacometti, Deborah L. Giasson, Guy P. Giasson, Michael Glassco, Nancy A. Gleim, William R. Gleim, Hiram Glenn, Jr, Donald Gobel, John Goromboly, Glen Graves, Harold L. Graves, Sandra R. Graves, Roger Gray, Kevin L. Greenfield, Wanda Greenfield, Janne C. Gregoire, Richard Gregoire, Lisa Griego, Mark Griffin, Margaret Groff, Phillip Groff, Henry Gross, Mary Grossbier, Gerald Gubanski, Fabian Guillen, Janet M. Gunter, Betty L. Hall, Dianne A. Hall, Janice L. Hall, Peter A. Hall, Raymond E. Hall, James Carter Hamilton, Kelley Renee Hamilton, Gregory Rothmere Hamlin, Mark Hammond, Cherie M. Hanks, Wilda J. Harbison, Dorothy J. Hardy, Richard C. Hardy, Frances Harmon, Happy Harrington, James Harris, June Harrison, Reginald Harrison, Paula Hartwell, Thomas Harward, Valerie Harward, Valerie Hasely, Jean B. Hastings, Robert L. Hastings, William Haverly, Larry Hawkins, Earl J. Hebert, Linda Hebert, Mary Heldenbrand, Harold Henderson, Jr, Judith A. Hendrix, Linda R. Hepner, David Herold, Kathleen Herold, Eric Herzog, Judith Ann Hildebrand, Ricky Hill, Royal Lee Hines, Patricia Hinrichs, Timothy Hinrichs, Darrell Hirsch, Julie Hobert, Irwin Hoffman, Jacqueline A. Hoffman, Theresa J. Hohenberger, Gloria Hollenbeck, James V. Holmes, Percy Holmes, Terry Homer, Henry R. Hooker, Naomi E. Hooker, Mark Hoover, Nancy Hoover, Bobby Gene Horine, Patricia Diane Horine, Jimmy Horton, Helen R. Hribar, Lyle Huisinga, Tracey Huisinga, Charles Edward Hundt, Carol Hutchinson, Charles Hutchinson, Linda Hyde, James Igoe, David Ishmael, Lisa Ishmael, Donna Jackson, Harry Jacobs, Danny L. James, Sr, Gail Jansen, David Jaramillo, Coleman Jarrett, Paula Jarrett, Venetia Jarrett, Patricia Jeffers, Marlene A. Jennings, Ross Jennings, James Jensen, Pamela Jerzak, Anthony Johnson, Celeste Johnson, Emma Jean Johnson, Eric C. Johnson, James Johnson, Karen J. Johnson, Kathleen Minadeo Johnson, Kathy Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Nancy C. Johnson, Norma Johnson, Sharon M. Johnson, Winnie Johnson, Jerry L. Johnson, Sr, Francine Mecca Jonas, Ronald Jonas, Donald Jones, Evelyn Jones, Frederick W. Jones, John C. Jurgerson, Denise Kabisch, Marilyn Katz, Carole Kearn, Nikki Kellogg, William Kellogg, Mauryce Kennon, Ronald Kimsey, Harry D Kinard, Sharon Ginger Kinard, Naomi Kingery, Roger Kingery, Taleeea Isaphine Kinsey, Lisa M. Kirk, David Kirkley, Dianna Kirkley, Larry Koenig, Tamara Koenig, Debra Korszeniewski, Nancy L. Koul, Melvin Kruse, Joseph A. LaRue, Joseph Abel LaRue, Jr, Joseph Abel LaRue, Jr, Cheryl Lachance, Donna M. Lalk, Jeannie Lansdell, Perry Lansdell, Anthony Laron, Diane Lattimore, David Lavares, Sheryl Lawman, Michael Lee, David R. Leitner, Joan M. Leitner, Dolores Lentine, Robert Lentine, Barbara Leonard, Franklin Lester, Lanny Long, Ruth Ann Long, Tamara Loosle, Edna Lopez, Joe F. Lopez, Roy Gene Lyles, Kathy Lyons, Richard Lyons, Bruce MacGurn, Cathy MacGurn, Andrew Maizner, Alan Maltin, Connie Maltin, Deborah Mancill, Peter Mancill, Barry Mang, Kim Elizabeth Manning, Sandra March, Robert Marchlewicz, Frank Marin, Paul Marino, Paul J. Marino, Judith Marketos, Beverly Marshall, Billy Marshall, Olga L. Martin, Terry D. Martin, Kristine M. Mason, Larry Mason, George Mattison, Linda Mattison, Mary McClarity, Katherine M. McClellan, Vera McClelland, Brian McCormick, Dorothea McCormick, S. Michael McCormick, Jammie McCovery, Shirley Ann McCright, Lester E. McDowell, Kathy McGee, Anita McGrady, Michael McGrady, D. Scott McIntosh, Joshua McIntosh, Marguerita C. McIntosh, Marvin R. McIntosh, Sharon McMahon, Sharon McMahon, James McQuerry, Martin Mead, Russell Meier, Mary Ann Meiling, Phillip Meiling, Dale Susan Meltzer, William Allan Menne, Martin Metzger, Hendrick Meuzelaar, Pieternella Meuzelaar, Carol Sue Meyer, Melvin Ray Meyer, Cheri A. Meyerhofer, Nicholas Meyerhofer, Terry Meza, Joanne L. Michaels, Karen Michaels, Evelyn Miller, James Miller, Jane Miller, Kenneth Miller, Linda Miller, Merle Miller, Phyllis Susan Miller, Victor Miller, Robert Milliron, Norman Mills, Yefim Milter, Elie M. Mims, Norma C. Mims, John Ming, Sharon Ming, Christine Minton, Michael Minton, Gregory Moen, Marilyn R. Monson, Lequata Montgomery, William Montgomery, Richard Montreuil, Angelia Moore, Betty Moore, Marsha Moore, Phillip Ray Moore, Alan M. Morales, Helen Morales, Kathy Morales, Horace Dewayne Morgan, Sharlene Morgan, Megan Mork, Beverly Morrison, Kristin A. Morrow, Theresa Morton, Geraldine Mouyios, Naysa Mowell, William Mowell, David L. Mulcahy, Gabriella Mulcahy, Jennifer Murin, Andlle Naeter, Rita Nail, Anthony Neal, Mathew Neelley, Vivian Neelley, Elizabeth S. Neily, Shawna Nelson, Deborah Newton, Stephen Nichols, Mark Ronald Nord, Cynthia Nydegger, Seth Nydegger, Henry Earl O'Cain, Dan Offrell, Edward Oksienik, Rod Olsen, Muriel Olson, Shirley Orsinelli, Joseph C. Ortega, Rita L. Ortega, Michael Oseguera, John Otey, James Dirk Owens, Lisa Owens, Evelyn Pacheco, Richard Paes, Charles Palmer, Marilyn M. Palmer, Mark Palmer, Don Palow, Sharron Palow, Larry Parrish, Bobbie Patterson, Eileen Paul, Jeffrey Paul, John Payne, Susan Peil, Darius Perez, Frances C. Perkins, Jan Perry, Robert Perry, Darren Peterson, Pamela Peterson, Alexander Petrovic, Vivian Petrovic, Lavern Pfeiffer, Herman Phillips, Wanda Phillips, Christine Piper, David F. Piper, Tolling Agreement Plaintiffs, Charles Plungis, Diane Plungis, Christa Poindex
February 27, 2018 Filing 2229 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Henry Earl O'Cain 1:14-cv-03587) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2228 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Michael & Anita McGrady 1:14-cv-1065) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2227 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Willie Seals & Cne' Seals 1:15-cv-00227) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2226 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Christopher J. Tsaltas 1:14-cv-03225) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2225 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing Brenda Vincent v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (1:15-cv-1609-WSD). (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
February 27, 2018 Filing 2224 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing Merle Miller v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (1:14-cv-1512-WSD). (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2223 ORDER dismissing the following actions pursuant to Local Rule 41.3A(2), N.D. Ga., for failure to obey a lawful order of the Court: Merle Miller v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (1:14-cv-1512-WSD) and Brenda Vincent v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (1:15-cv-1609-WSD). Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 2/27/18. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2222 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Willie Seals & Cne' Seals, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00227-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2221 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Henry Earl O'Cain, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-03587-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2220 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Michael & Anita McGrady, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-1065-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2219 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Christopher J. Tsaltas, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-3225-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2222 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Willie Seals & Cne' Seals, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00227-WSD) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2221 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Henry Earl O'Cain, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-03587-WSD) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2220 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Michael & Anita McGrady, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-1065-WSD) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2219 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Christopher J. Tsaltas, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-3225-WSD) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2218 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Kathy McGee, Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-00879-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2217 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Tracey & Lyle Huisinga, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00620-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2216 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Gloria Hollenbeck, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01621-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2215 Stipulation of Dismissal Without prejudice as to Dianne A. Hall, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00180-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2214 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to James Henry Garcia, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-04115-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2213 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Nancie & Douglas Feld, Civil Action Number 1:4-cv-02952-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2212 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Nancy Dolensek, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00024-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 27, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2211 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Lawrence Bachelder, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-2593-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 26, 2018 Filing 2218 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Kathy McGee 1:17-cv-00879) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 26, 2018 Filing 2217 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Tracey & Lyle Huisinga 1:15-cv-00620) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 26, 2018 Filing 2216 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Gloria Hollenbeck 1:13-cv-01621) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 26, 2018 Filing 2215 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dianne A. Hall 1:14-cv-00180) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 26, 2018 Filing 2214 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James Henry Garcia 1:14-cv-04115) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 26, 2018 Filing 2213 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nancie & Douglas Feld 1:4-cv-02952) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 26, 2018 Filing 2212 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nancy Dolensek 1:15-cv-00024) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 26, 2018 Filing 2211 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Lawrence Bachelder 1:13-cv-2593) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2210 ORDER WITHDRAWING Order to Show Cause as to Brenda Cochran (2149 in 1:12-md-02329-WSD) and (6 in 1:15-cv-02829-WSD). Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 2/23/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:15-cv-02829-WSD(adg)
February 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2209 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Brenda & David Cochran, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-02829-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2207 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to James Wyly Watts, Jr., Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-03674-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2206 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Jacqueline Ann Stanley Tumey, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00025-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2205 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Jane Sprecher, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-629-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2204 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Jeanne M. Schifano, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00351-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2203 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to David L Ranson, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02475-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2202 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Edward Rainville, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00973-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2201 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Christine Powell, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-03285-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2200 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Richard Montreuil, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00239-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2199 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Mark Hammond, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-1788-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2198 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Thomas Gadbois & Patricia Jeffers, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-0750-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2197 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to James & Sadie Calvert, Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-00350-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2196 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Angelika & Norman Black, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-03409-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 22, 2018 Filing 2209 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Brenda & David Cochran 1:15-cv-02829) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 22, 2018 Filing 2208 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: Status Conference held on 2/22/2018 in chambers. A further status conference is set for May 3, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Nicholas A. Marrone)(ddm)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2207 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James Wyly Watts, Jr. 1:14-cv-03674) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2206 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jacqueline Ann & Stanley Tumey 1:15-cv-00025) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2205 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jane Sprecher 1:14-cv-629) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2204 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jeanne M. Schifano 1:15-cv-00351) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2203 STIPULATION of Dismissal (David L Ranson 1:14-cv-02475) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2202 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Edward Rainville 1:14-cv-00973) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2201 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Christine Powell 1:14-cv-03285) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2200 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Richard Montreuil 1:15-cv-00239) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2199 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Mark Hammond 1:16-cv-1788) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2198 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Thomas Gadbois & Patricia Jeffers 1:14-cv-0750) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2197 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James & Sadie Calvert 1:17-cv-00350) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2196 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Angelika & Norman Black 1:14-cv-03409) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 16, 2018 Filing 2195 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #2149 Order to Show Cause,,. (McGlamry, Michael)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2194 ORDER: The Court WITHDRAWS the #2149 Order to Show Cause ( #6 in 1:17-cv-00350-WSD), ( #8 in 1:16-cv-01788-WSD), ( #11 in 1:13-cv-03097-WSD), ( #11 in 1:14-cv-00750-WSD), and ( #9 in 1:14-cv-03409-WSD) with respect to the following Plaintiffs: Angela Black, James Calvert, Thomas Gadbois,Farhad Shatti, and Mark Hammond. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 02/15/18. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD et al.(aaq)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2193 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #2149 Order to Show Cause,,. (McGlamry, Michael)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2191 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Kanendra Shaw, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-2180-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2189 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Karen Michaels, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-01691-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2188 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to William Allan Menne, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-03786-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2187 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Shirley Ann McCright, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-204-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2186 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Kristine Mason, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02484-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2185 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Joe & Edna Lopez, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02363-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2184 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Taleea Isaphine Kinsey, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-368-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2183 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to William & Nikki Lynn Kellogg, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00380-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2182 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Jimmy Horton, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-01690-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2181 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Jacqueline & Irwin Hoffman, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02897-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2180 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Ricky Hill, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-2166-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2179 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Gregory Rothmere Hamlin, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-03697-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2178 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Jerry French, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00382-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2177 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Linda Floyd, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02356-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2176 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Arthur Elliot, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-03676-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2175 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Cheryl & Robert Doebrick, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02340-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2174 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Ronald & Lisa Diercksen, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00383-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2190 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Donald Roberts 1:12-cv-02830-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2173 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Sammy & Denise Carnegie, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00298-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2172 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Ray Bradshaw Jr., Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-04114-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii)Ray Bradshaw Jr. 1:14-cv-04114 (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2171 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Randy S. Bradshaw, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-04090-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2192 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to James Owens, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-3074-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2170 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Jerdine Williams, Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-00082-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2167 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Glenda Walter, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03080-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2166 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Sylvia Tate, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02430-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2165 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Glen Stanton, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-02355-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2164 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Larry Smart, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-03443-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2163 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Mark & Melinda Sissom, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-02701-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2162 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Reina Sandoval, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01795-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2161 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to John Robicheux, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-2238-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2160 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Ruth Richardson, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-3072-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2159 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Robert & Denise Davis-Reno, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00864-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2158 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Angela & Oscar Pokorny 1:14-cv-03151-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2157 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Mark Ronald Nord, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02394-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2156 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Andelle Naeter, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-01023-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2155 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Theresa Morton, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02392-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2191 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Kanendra Shaw 1:15-cv-2180) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2190 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Donald Roberts 1:12-cv-02830) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2189 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Karen Michaels 1:14-cv-01691) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2188 STIPULATION of Dismissal (William Allan Menne 1:14-cv-03786) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2187 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Shirley Ann McCright 1:15-cv-204) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2186 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Kristine Mason 1:14-cv-02484) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2185 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joe & Edna Lopez 1:14-cv-02363) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2184 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Taleea Isaphine Kinsey 1:15-cv-368) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2183 STIPULATION of Dismissal (William & Nikki Lynn Kellogg 1:14-cv-00380) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2182 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jimmy Horton 1:14-cv-01690) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2181 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jacqueline & Irwin Hoffman 1:14-cv-02897) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2180 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ricky Hill 1:15-cv-2166) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2179 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Gregory Rothmere Hamlin 1:14-cv-03697) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2178 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jerry French 1:14-cv-00382) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2177 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Linda Floyd 1:14-cv-02356) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2176 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Arthur Elliot 1:14-cv-03676) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2175 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Cheryl & Robert Doebrick 1:14-cv-02340) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2174 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ronald & Lisa Diercksen 1:14-cv-00383) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2173 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Sammy & Denise Carnegie 1:14-cv-00298) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2172 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ray Bradshaw Jr. 1:14-cv-04114) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2171 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Randy S. Bradshaw 1:14-cv-04090) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2192 STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii (James Owens 1:12-cv-3074) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2170 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jerdine Williams 1:17-cv-00082) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2169 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Faye & Ronnie Weatherford 1:16-cv-4204) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2168 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Rachel Ann Watilo 1:14-cv-03016) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2167 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Glenda Walter 1:12-cv-03080) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2166 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Sylvia Tate 1:13-cv-02430) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2165 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Glen Stanton 1:15-cv-02355) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2164 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Larry Smart 1:14-cv-03443) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2163 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Mark & Melinda Sissom 1:12-cv-02701) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (7 in 1:16-cv-04204-WSD) Faye and Ronnie Weatherford's Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:16-cv-04204-WSD(jkl)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2162 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Reina Sandoval 1:13-cv-01795) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (2154 in 1:12-md-02329-WSD) (11 in 1:15-cv-00632-WSD) Melvin Kruse's Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:15-cv-00632-WSD(jkl)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2161 STIPULATION of Dismissal (John Robicheux 1:14-cv-2238) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING Rachel Watilo's (19 in 1:14-cv-03016-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:14-cv-03016-WSD(jkl)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2160 STIPULATION of Dismissal Ruth Richardson 1:15-cv-3072) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2159 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Robert & Denise Davis-Reno 1:15-cv-00864) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (2150 in 1:12-md-02329-WSD) (10 in 1:14-cv-02327-WSD) Janell Foster Bryson's Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:14-cv-02327-WSD(jkl)
February 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (2151 in 1:12-md-02329-WSD) (20 in 1:13-cv-03085-WSD) DAVID AND KAY CURRENS' Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudive pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:13-cv-03085-WSD(jkl)
February 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (12 in 1:13-cv-00234-WSD) (2152 in 1:12-md-02329-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) by Plaintiffs DENNIS M. DOYLE and KATHLEEN A. DOYLE. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:13-cv-00234-WSD(jkl)
February 9, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (2153 in 1:12-md-02329-WSD)(15 in 1:13-cv-00164-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) by Plaintiffs Leah Elshaug and Shane Elshaug . Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:13-cv-00164-WSD(jkl)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2158 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Angela & Oscar Pokorny 1:14-cv-03151) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2157 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Mark Ronald Nord 1:13-cv-02394) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2156 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Andelle Naeter 1:14-cv-01023) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2155 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Theresa Morton 1:13-cv-02392) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2154 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Melvin Kruse 1:15-cv-00632) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2153 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Shane & Leah Elshaug 1:13-cv-00164) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2152 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dennis & Kathleen Doyle 1:13-cv-00234) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2151 STIPULATION of Dismissal (David & Kay Currens 1:13-cv-03085) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2150 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Janell Foster Bryson 1:14-cv-02327) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 7, 2018 Clerks Certificate of Mailing to Taylor Martino, P.C. and attorneys Christopher S. Livas and Mallory J. Mangold re #2149 Order. (ddm)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2149 ORDER directing that individual counsel for Plaintiffs Angela Black, James Calvert, William Chrostowski, Brenda Cochran, Thomas Gadbois, Mark Hammond, Merle Miller, and Farhad Shatti shall file, on or before February 20, 2018, an explanation with the Court regarding their failure to communicate with Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel the status of their case and why their individual action should not be dismissed. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the individual actions. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 2/7/18. (ddm)
February 2, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2148 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Beatrice Rotondi, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02653-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
February 2, 2018 Filing 2148 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Beatrice Rotondi 1:14-cv-02653) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
February 1, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (10 in 1:13-cv-03274-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal, (11 in 1:13-cv-03481-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal, (10 in 1:12-cv-03046-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:12-cv-03046-WSD, 1:13-cv-03274-WSD, 1:13-cv-03481-WSD(bdb)
January 31, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2136 Stipulation of Dismissal, #2137 Stipulation of Dismissal, #2138 Stipulation of Dismissal, #2139 Stipulation of Dismissal, #2140 Stipulation of Dismissal, #2141 Stipulation of Dismissal, #2142 Stipulation of Dismissal, and #2143 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (sap)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2146 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Rosie Young 1:12-cv-03046) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2145 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James Townsend 1:13-cv-03274) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2144 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Robert & Dawn Schacker 1:13-cv-3481) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2143 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joshua McIntosh 1:13-cv-0189) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2142 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Franklin Lester 1:13-cv-0188) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2141 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Frederick Jones 1:12-cv-03248) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2140 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Shirley Fisher 1:13-cv-0186) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2139 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Caroldina & Eliel Cruz 1:12-cv-2544) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2138 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Helen Crocker-Pope 1:13-cv-0185) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2137 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joe Council 1:14-cv-03065) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2136 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Barbara & Johnnie Alexander 1:14-cv-01782) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 30, 2018 Filing 2147 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Stesiak on behalf of Clarence L. Shively, Sharri S. Shively Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:17-cv-01051-WSD(adg)
January 29, 2018 Filing 2135 NOTICE by Michael Abegg, Dennis Abts, Cathy Adams, Gerald Adams, Michael Shane Adams, Gaetano Aiello, Marjorie Aiello, David Albright, Elaine Albright, Deborah Aldrich, James Aldrich, Barbara A. Alexander, Johnnie Alexander, Willie Alexander, Catherine Allen, Danny Ray Allen, Michael XX Allen, Michael Allen, Michael Allen, Willa J. Allen, Samuel Ambler, Jacqueline Ames, Colleen Amirr, Joseph Amirr, Douglas F. Anderson, Janet B. Anderson, Ray Anderson, Sharon Anderson, Douglas Armstrong, Tammi Armstrong, Gene Arnold, Harvey Arnold, Joan Arnold, Karen Arnold, Larry Arnold, Judith Arvoy, Nancy Atherton, Lawrence Bachelder, Sherri Bacovsky, Steven J. Bacovsky, Ruth M. Bader, Shalonda Bailey, Jimmie Lee Baker, Laurel Baker, Mary Baker, Wayne Baker, Corey S. Barnard, Dorothy Jean Barnhouse, Otto Herbert Barnhouse, Carmela Barone, Giovanni Barone, Gail Bartels, John Bartels, Dorothy K. Barth, Ronald D. Barth, David Barton, Teresa Barwick, Allison Benson, Karyn Bentlin, Richard Bentlin, Heather A. Bianciotto, Gina Bianckino, Steven Birkson, Elizabeth Birmingham, Thomas E. Birmingham, Angelika Black, Norman Black, Pauline Blair, Karen Block, Hilda Blount, Bonnie Sue Bogert, Richard E. Bogert, David L. Bonham, Donald Bonkosky, John Borg, Terry Borg, Richard Robert Bourdeaux, Stephanie Bourdeaux, Donald Bowers, Patricia Bowers, Fred Braasch, Michaela Braasch, Randy Scott Bradshaw, Ray Bradshaw, Jr, Vickie Branham, Tandy Branham III, Cecil Brannan, Constance Brannan, Linda Bratcher, Larry A. Breeze, Valerie Brennan, Phyllis Brenneman, Hope Briggs, Robert L. Brock, Christine Catherine Brooks, Nicole Brooks, Doris Jean Brown, Joseph Brown, Letha Brown, Steven Brown, Sr, Arthur Bruce, Dorothy Bruce, Theresa Brunori, Stephen F. Brynelson, Janell Foster Bryson, Sheldon Buch, Charles W. Buettenmuller, Mary Burgart, Roger Burgart, John E. Burger, Cecil Burnett, David Burns, Saundra Burns, Jeffery Butler, Jeffrey E. Butler, Margreth C. Butterworth, James Button, Tessa Cain, William Cain, James Calvert, Sadie Calvert, Denise Calzada, John Campbell, Doug Cannady, Gayle Cannady, Nicholas Carl, Denise Carnegie, Sammy Carnegie, Edith Carnes, Frances Carter, Wanda Carter, Gerald G. Case, Gerald Case, Joann Case, Susan Case, Edward J. Cherveny, Annette Childs, Robert Lee Chisolm, Dennis Christensen, Florence Christensen, Gene Christiansen, Robyn Christiansen, John Christy, William Chrostowski, Tina Marie Cien, Joe A. Cienfuegos, Jr, Twyla Clarke, France Clausen, Mark A. Clausen, Cathleen Claussenius, Barry A. Cochran, Brenda Cochran, David Cochran, Diana C. Cochran, Eleda Cohen, Phyllis Coleman, Otis Collier, Mary Constantino, Leslee Cook, William Earl Cook, Jr, Joe Council, Mae Ellar Cowart, Billy Eugene Cox, Celia E. Cox, Patricia L. Croak, Richard B. Croak, Helen Crocker-Pope, Steven Cross, Carlodina J. Cruz, Eliel Cruz, Ernest Cummings, Kathryn Cummings, Nancy Cunningham, Samantha Curran, Dave Currens, Kay Currens, Margaret Curtis, GERALD DAUGHERTY, MARIANNE DAUGHERTY, Joey Daigle, Brian K. Dameron, Jo Dawn Danley, Richard Danley, Joann Daskivich, Michael Daskivich, Diona Davis, Ginger Davis, James E. Davis, Denise Davis-Reno, Brian M. Day, Patricia M. Day, Linda DeHoet, Cresencio DeJesus, Patricia DeJesus, Milton DeLair, Patricia DeLair, John R. DeWolf, Paula DeWolf, Cheri Dees, Jace Dees, Francine Degenhardt, Thomas Degenhardt, Jerry Dennard, Jr, Mary Destouet, Diane Deville, Roman Deville, Anne L. Dickerson, J'Renee Dickson, Lisa Diercksen, Ronald Diercksen, Ray Z. Dissinger, David Dockerty, Larry R. Dodd, Cheryl K. Doebrick, Robert J. Doebrick, Larry C. Dogs, Noreen M. Dogs, Nancy Dolensek, Kathleen Dougherty, Lawrence Dougherty, Jr, Katherine Douglas, Robert Douglas, Leilani Dow, Dennis M. Doyle, Kathleen A. Doyle, Janet E. Duecy, Jane Duke, Myron Dunn, Nancy Dunn, Rosemary Duvall, William Duvall, Doris Edelman, Sheldon Edelman, Ray Eigenbrode, Benjamin Eisenberg, Marilyn Eisenberg, Larita Elias, Mervin Elias, Kathy L. Eliason, Arthur E. Elliott, Leah Elshaug, Shane Elshaug, Lisa Elston, Michael Feinberg, Douglas Feld, Nancie Feld, June Feldman, Fred W. Fewell, Martha J. Fewell, James Fields, Linda Fields, Alberto Fierro, Ann Fillmore, Ben Fillmore, Amy Fine, Steven Fine, Pauline Finstad, Robert Finstad, Linda M. Fishel, Stephen M. Fishel, Shirley Fisher, Linda K. Floyd, Shirley Foliart, Margie J. Fredrickson, Craig J. Freebersyser, Janice M. Freebersyser, Jerry French, Nicole M. Frey, Donald Friend, Gina Friend, George Fry, Jr, Rosemary Fry, Thomas Gadbois, Authelia Gallman, Bertha Gamble, Gary Gamble, Cynthia Gandy, Patrick Gandy, Shelley Garbes, James Henry Garcia, Diane Gebhart, Robert A. Gebhart, II, Robert Giacometti, Sally Giacometti, Deborah L. Giasson, Guy P. Giasson, Michael Glassco, Nancy A. Gleim, William R. Gleim, Hiram Glenn, Jr, Donald Gobel, John Goromboly, Glen Graves, Harold L. Graves, Sandra R. Graves, Roger Gray, Kevin L. Greenfield, Wanda Greenfield, Janne C. Gregoire, Richard Gregoire, Lisa Griego, Mark Griffin, Margaret Groff, Phillip Groff, Henry Gross, Mary Grossbier, Gerald Gubanski, Fabian Guillen, Janet M. Gunter, Betty L. Hall, Dianne A. Hall, Janice L. Hall, Peter A. Hall, Raymond E. Hall, James Carter Hamilton, Kelley Renee Hamilton, Gregory Rothmere Hamlin, Mark Hammond, Cherie M. Hanks, Wilda J. Harbison, Dorothy J. Hardy, Richard C. Hardy, Frances Harmon, Happy Harrington, James Harris, June Harrison, Reginald Harrison, Paula Hartwell, Thomas Harward, Valerie Harward, Valerie Hasely, Jean B. Hastings, Robert L. Hastings, William Haverly, Larry Hawkins, Earl J. Hebert, Linda Hebert, Mary Heldenbrand, Harold Henderson, Jr, Judith A. Hendrix, Linda R. Hepner, David Herold, Kathleen Herold, Eric Herzog, Judith Ann Hildebrand, Ricky Hill, Royal Lee Hines, Patricia Hinrichs, Timothy Hinrichs, Darrell Hirsch, Julie Hobert, Irwin Hoffman, Jacqueline A. Hoffman, Theresa J. Hohenberger, Gloria Hollenbeck, James V. Holmes, Percy Holmes, Terry Homer, Henry R. Hooker, Naomi E. Hooker, Mark Hoover, Nancy Hoover, Bobby Gene Horine, Patricia Diane Horine, Jimmy Horton, Helen R. Hribar, Lyle Huisinga, Tracey Huisinga, Charles Edward Hundt, Carol Hutchinson, Charles Hutchinson, Linda Hyde, James Igoe, David Ishmael, Lisa Ishmael, Donna Jackson, Harry Jacobs, Danny L. James, Sr, Gail Jansen, David Jaramillo, Coleman Jarrett, Paula Jarrett, Venetia Jarrett, Patricia Jeffers, Marlene A. Jennings, Ross Jennings, James Jensen, Pamela Jerzak, Anthony Johnson, Celeste Johnson, Emma Jean Johnson, Eric C. Johnson, James Johnson, Karen J. Johnson, Kathleen Minadeo Johnson, Kathy Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Nancy C. Johnson, Norma Johnson, Sharon M. Johnson, Winnie Johnson, Jerry L. Johnson, Sr, Francine Mecca Jonas, Ronald Jonas, Donald Jones, Evelyn Jones, Frederick W. Jones, John C. Jurgerson, Denise Kabisch, Marilyn Katz, Carole Kearn, Nikki Kellogg, William Kellogg, Mauryce Kennon, Ronald Kimsey, Harry D Kinard, Sharon Ginger Kinard, Naomi Kingery, Roger Kingery, Taleeea Isaphine Kinsey, Lisa M. Kirk, David Kirkley, Dianna Kirkley, Larry Koenig, Tamara Koenig, Debra Korszeniewski, Nancy L. Koul, Melvin Kruse, Joseph A. LaRue, Joseph Abel LaRue, Jr, Cheryl Lachance, Donna M. Lalk, Jeannie Lansdell, Perry Lansdell, Anthony Laron, Diane Lattimore, David Lavares, Sheryl Lawman, Michael Lee, David R. Leitner, Joan M. Leitner, Dolores Lentine, Robert Lentine, Barbara Leonard, Franklin Lester, Lanny Long, Ruth Ann Long, Tamara Loosle, Edna Lopez, Joe F. Lopez, Roy Gene Lyles, Kathy Lyons, Richard Lyons, Bruce MacGurn, Cathy MacGurn, Andrew Maizner, Alan Maltin, Connie Maltin, Deborah Mancill, Peter Mancill, Barry Mang, Kim Elizabeth Manning, Sandra March, Robert Marchlewicz, Frank Marin, Paul Marino, Paul J. Marino, Judith Marketos, Beverly Marshall, Billy Marshall, Olga L. Martin, Terry D. Martin, Kristine M. Mason, Larry Mason, George Mattison, Linda Mattison, Mary McClarity, Katherine M. McClellan, Vera McClelland, Brian McCormick, Dorothea McCormick, S. Michael McCormick, Jammie McCovery, Shirley Ann McCright, Lester E. McDowell, Kathy McGee, Anita McGrady, Michael McGrady, D. Scott McIntosh, Joshua McIntosh, Marguerita C. McIntosh, Marvin R. McIntosh, Sharon McMahon(as Executor of the Estate of Rosemary Maser, deceased), Sharon McMahon(as Executor of the Estate of Rosemary Maser, deceased,), James McQuerry, Martin Mead, Russell Meier, Mary Ann Meiling, Phillip Meiling, Dale Susan Meltzer, William Allan Menne, Martin Metzger, Hendrick Meuzelaar, Pieternella Meuzelaar, Carol Sue Meyer, Melvin Ray Meyer, Cheri A. Meyerhofer, Nicholas Meyerhofer, Terry Meza, Joanne L. Michaels, Karen Michaels, Evelyn Miller, James Miller, Jane Miller, Kenneth Miller, Linda Miller, Merle Miller, Phyllis Susan Miller, Victor Miller, Robert Milliron, Norman Mills, Yefim Milter, Elie M. Mims, Norma C. Mims, John Ming, Sharon Ming, Christine Minton, Michael Minton, Gregory Moen, Marilyn R. Monson, Lequata Montgomery, William Montgomery, Richard Montreuil, Angelia Moore, Betty Moore, Marsha Moore, Phillip Ray Moore, Alan M. Morales, Helen Morales, Kathy Morales, Horace Dewayne Morgan, Sharlene Morgan, Megan Mork, Beverly Morrison, Kristin A. Morrow, Theresa Morton, Geraldine Mouyios, Naysa Mowell, William Mowell, David L. Mulcahy, Gabriella Mulcahy, Jennifer Murin, Andlle Naeter, Rita Nail, Anthony Neal, Mathew Neelley, Vivian Neelley, Elizabeth S. Neily, Shawna Nelson, Deborah Newton, Stephen Nichols, Mark Ronald Nord, Cynthia Nydegger, Seth Nydegger, Henry Earl O'Cain, Dan Offrell, Edward Oksienik, Rod Olsen, Muriel Olson, Shirley Orsinelli, Joseph C. Ortega, Rita L. Ortega, Michael Oseguera, John Otey, James Dirk Owens, Lisa Owens, Evelyn Pacheco, Richard Paes, Charles Palmer, Marilyn M. Palmer, Mark Palmer, Don Palow, Sharron Palow, Larry Parrish, Bobbie Patterson, Eileen Paul, Jeffrey Paul, John Payne, Susan Peil, Darius Perez, Frances C. Perkins, Jan Perry, Robert Perry, Darren Peterson, Pamela Peterson, Alexander Petrovic, Vivian Petrovic, Lavern Pfeiffer, Herman Phillips, Wanda Phillips, Christine Piper, David F. Piper, Tolling Agreement Plaintiffs, Charles Plungis, Diane Plungis, Christa Poindexter, Angela Pokorny, Oscar C. Pokorny, Timothy J. Poling, Janet Pommrehn, Joanne P
January 25, 2018 NOTICE OF HEARING (by docket entry only): An In-Chambers Status Conference is set for 2/22/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. Lead counsel to appear. (bgt)
January 19, 2018 Filing 2134 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel's Status Report Concerning Cases Requiring Remand or Dismissal by Michael Abegg, Dennis Abts, Cathy Adams, Gerald Adams, Michael Shane Adams, Gaetano Aiello, Marjorie Aiello, David Albright, Elaine Albright, Deborah Aldrich, James Aldrich, Barbara A. Alexander, Johnnie Alexander, Willie Alexander, Catherine Allen, Danny Ray Allen, Michael XX Allen, Michael Allen, Michael Allen, Willa J. Allen, Samuel Ambler, Jacqueline Ames, Colleen Amirr, Joseph Amirr, Douglas F. Anderson, Janet B. Anderson, Ray Anderson, Sharon Anderson, Douglas Armstrong, Tammi Armstrong, Gene Arnold, Harvey Arnold, Joan Arnold, Karen Arnold, Larry Arnold, Judith Arvoy, Nancy Atherton, Lawrence Bachelder, Sherri Bacovsky, Steven J. Bacovsky, Ruth M. Bader, Shalonda Bailey, Jimmie Lee Baker, Laurel Baker, Mary Baker, Wayne Baker, Corey S. Barnard, Dorothy Jean Barnhouse, Otto Herbert Barnhouse, Carmela Barone, Giovanni Barone, Gail Bartels, John Bartels, Dorothy K. Barth, Ronald D. Barth, David Barton, Teresa Barwick, Allison Benson, Karyn Bentlin, Richard Bentlin, Heather A. Bianciotto, Gina Bianckino, Steven Birkson, Elizabeth Birmingham, Thomas E. Birmingham, Norman Black, Pauline Blair, Karen Block, Hilda Blount, Bonnie Sue Bogert, Richard E. Bogert, David L. Bonham, Donald Bonkosky, John Borg, Terry Borg, Richard Robert Bourdeaux, Stephanie Bourdeaux, Donald Bowers, Patricia Bowers, Fred Braasch, Michaela Braasch, Randy Scott Bradshaw, Ray Bradshaw, Jr, Vickie Branham, Tandy Branham III, Cecil Brannan, Constance Brannan, Linda Bratcher, Larry A. Breeze, Valerie Brennan, Phyllis Brenneman, Hope Briggs, Robert L. Brock, Christine Catherine Brooks, Nicole Brooks, Doris Jean Brown, Joseph Brown, Letha Brown, Steven Brown, Sr, Arthur Bruce, Dorothy Bruce, Theresa Brunori, Stephen F. Brynelson, Janell Foster Bryson, Sheldon Buch, Charles W. Buettenmuller, Mary Burgart, Roger Burgart, John E. Burger, Cecil Burnett, David Burns, Saundra Burns, Jeffery Butler, Jeffrey E. Butler, Margreth C. Butterworth, James Button, Tessa Cain, William Cain, James Calvert, Sadie Calvert, Denise Calzada, John Campbell, Doug Cannady, Gayle Cannady, Nicholas Carl, Denise Carnegie, Sammy Carnegie, Edith Carnes, Frances Carter, Wanda Carter, Gerald G. Case, Gerald Case, Joann Case, Susan Case, Edward J. Cherveny, Annette Childs, Robert Lee Chisolm, Dennis Christensen, Florence Christensen, Gene Christiansen, Robyn Christiansen, John Christy, William Chrostowski, Tina Marie Cien, Joe A. Cienfuegos, Jr, Twyla Clarke, France Clausen, Mark A. Clausen, Cathleen Claussenius, Barry A. Cochran, Brenda Cochran, David Cochran, Diana C. Cochran, Eleda Cohen, Phyllis Coleman, Otis Collier, Mary Constantino, Leslee Cook, William Earl Cook, Jr, Joe Council, Mae Ellar Cowart, Billy Eugene Cox, Celia E. Cox, Patricia L. Croak, Richard B. Croak, Helen Crocker-Pope, Steven Cross, Carlodina J. Cruz, Eliel Cruz, Ernest Cummings, Kathryn Cummings, Nancy Cunningham, Samantha Curran, Dave Currens, Kay Currens, Margaret Curtis, GERALD DAUGHERTY, MARIANNE DAUGHERTY, Joey Daigle, Brian K. Dameron, Jo Dawn Danley, Richard Danley, Joann Daskivich, Michael Daskivich, Diona Davis, Ginger Davis, James E. Davis, Denise Davis-Reno, Brian M. Day, Patricia M. Day, Linda DeHoet, Cresencio DeJesus, Patricia DeJesus, Milton DeLair, Patricia DeLair, John R. DeWolf, Paula DeWolf, Cheri Dees, Jace Dees, Francine Degenhardt, Thomas Degenhardt, Jerry Dennard, Jr, Mary Destouet, Diane Deville, Roman Deville, Anne L. Dickerson, J'Renee Dickson, Lisa Diercksen, Ronald Diercksen, Ray Z. Dissinger, David Dockerty, Larry R. Dodd, Cheryl K. Doebrick, Robert J. Doebrick, Larry C. Dogs, Noreen M. Dogs, Nancy Dolensek, Kathleen Dougherty, Lawrence Dougherty, Jr, Katherine Douglas, Robert Douglas, Leilani Dow, Dennis M. Doyle, Kathleen A. Doyle, Janet E. Duecy, Jane Duke, Myron Dunn, Nancy Dunn, Rosemary Duvall, William Duvall, Doris Edelman, Sheldon Edelman, Ray Eigenbrode, Benjamin Eisenberg, Marilyn Eisenberg, Larita Elias, Mervin Elias, Kathy L. Eliason, Arthur E. Elliott, Leah Elshaug, Shane Elshaug, Lisa Elston, Michael Feinberg, Douglas Feld, Nancie Feld, June Feldman, Fred W. Fewell, Martha J. Fewell, James Fields, Linda Fields, Alberto Fierro, Ann Fillmore, Ben Fillmore, Amy Fine, Steven Fine, Pauline Finstad, Robert Finstad, Linda M. Fishel, Stephen M. Fishel, Shirley Fisher, Linda K. Floyd, Shirley Foliart, Margie J. Fredrickson, Craig J. Freebersyser, Janice M. Freebersyser, Jerry French, Nicole M. Frey, Donald Friend, Gina Friend, George Fry, Jr, Rosemary Fry, Thomas Gadbois, Authelia Gallman, Bertha Gamble, Gary Gamble, Cynthia Gandy, Patrick Gandy, Shelley Garbes, James Henry Garcia, Diane Gebhart, Robert A. Gebhart, II, Robert Giacometti, Sally Giacometti, Deborah L. Giasson, Guy P. Giasson, Michael Glassco, Nancy A. Gleim, William R. Gleim, Hiram Glenn, Jr, Donald Gobel, John Goromboly, Glen Graves, Harold L. Graves, Sandra R. Graves, Roger Gray, Kevin L. Greenfield, Wanda Greenfield, Janne C. Gregoire, Richard Gregoire, Lisa Griego, Mark Griffin, Margaret Groff, Phillip Groff, Henry Gross, Mary Grossbier, Gerald Gubanski, Fabian Guillen, Janet M. Gunter, Betty L. Hall, Dianne A. Hall, Janice L. Hall, Peter A. Hall, Raymond E. Hall, James Carter Hamilton, Kelley Renee Hamilton, Gregory Rothmere Hamlin, Mark Hammond, Cherie M. Hanks, Wilda J. Harbison, Dorothy J. Hardy, Richard C. Hardy, Frances Harmon, Happy Harrington, James Harris, June Harrison, Reginald Harrison, Paula Hartwell, Thomas Harward, Valerie Harward, Valerie Hasely, Jean B. Hastings, Robert L. Hastings, William Haverly, Larry Hawkins, Earl J. Hebert, Linda Hebert, Mary Heldenbrand, Harold Henderson, Jr, Judith A. Hendrix, Linda R. Hepner, David Herold, Kathleen Herold, Eric Herzog, Judith Ann Hildebrand, Ricky Hill, Royal Lee Hines, Patricia Hinrichs, Timothy Hinrichs, Darrell Hirsch, Julie Hobert, Irwin Hoffman, Jacqueline A. Hoffman, Theresa J. Hohenberger, Gloria Hollenbeck, James V. Holmes, Percy Holmes, Terry Homer, Henry R. Hooker, Naomi E. Hooker, Mark Hoover, Nancy Hoover, Bobby Gene Horine, Patricia Diane Horine, Jimmy Horton, Helen R. Hribar, Lyle Huisinga, Tracey Huisinga, Charles Edward Hundt, Carol Hutchinson, Charles Hutchinson, Linda Hyde, James Igoe, David Ishmael, Lisa Ishmael, Donna Jackson, Harry Jacobs, Danny L. James, Sr, Gail Jansen, David Jaramillo, Coleman Jarrett, Paula Jarrett, Venetia Jarrett, Patricia Jeffers, Marlene A. Jennings, Ross Jennings, James Jensen, Pamela Jerzak, Anthony Johnson, Celeste Johnson, Emma Jean Johnson, Eric C. Johnson, James Johnson, Karen J. Johnson, Kathleen Minadeo Johnson, Kathy Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Nancy C. Johnson, Norma Johnson, Sharon M. Johnson, Winnie Johnson, Jerry L. Johnson, Sr, Francine Mecca Jonas, Ronald Jonas, Donald Jones, Evelyn Jones, Frederick W. Jones, John C. Jurgerson, Denise Kabisch, Marilyn Katz, Carole Kearn, Nikki Kellogg, William Kellogg, Mauryce Kennon, Ronald Kimsey, Harry D Kinard, Sharon Ginger Kinard, Naomi Kingery, Roger Kingery, Taleeea Isaphine Kinsey, Lisa M. Kirk, David Kirkley, Dianna Kirkley, Larry Koenig, Tamara Koenig, Debra Korszeniewski, Nancy L. Koul, Melvin Kruse, Joseph A. LaRue, Joseph Abel LaRue, Jr, Cheryl Lachance, Donna M. Lalk, Jeannie Lansdell, Perry Lansdell, Anthony Laron, Diane Lattimore, David Lavares, Sheryl Lawman, Michael Lee, David R. Leitner, Joan M. Leitner, Dolores Lentine, Robert Lentine, Barbara Leonard, Franklin Lester, Lanny Long, Ruth Ann Long, Tamara Loosle, Edna Lopez, Joe F. Lopez, Roy Gene Lyles, Kathy Lyons, Richard Lyons, Bruce MacGurn, Cathy MacGurn, Andrew Maizner, Alan Maltin, Connie Maltin, Deborah Mancill, Peter Mancill, Barry Mang, Kim Elizabeth Manning, Sandra March, Robert Marchlewicz, Frank Marin, Paul Marino, Paul J. Marino, Judith Marketos, Beverly Marshall, Billy Marshall, Olga L. Martin, Terry D. Martin, Kristine M. Mason, Larry Mason, George Mattison, Linda Mattison, Mary McClarity, Katherine M. McClellan, Vera McClelland, Brian McCormick, Dorothea McCormick, S. Michael McCormick, Jammie McCovery, Shirley Ann McCright, Lester E. McDowell, Kathy McGee, Anita McGrady, Michael McGrady, D. Scott McIntosh, Joshua McIntosh, Marguerita C. McIntosh, Marvin R. McIntosh, Sharon McMahon(as Executor of the Estate of Rosemary Maser, deceased), Sharon McMahon(as Executor of the Estate of Rosemary Maser, deceased,), James McQuerry, Martin Mead, Russell Meier, Mary Ann Meiling, Phillip Meiling, Dale Susan Meltzer, William Allan Menne, Martin Metzger, Hendrick Meuzelaar, Pieternella Meuzelaar, Carol Sue Meyer, Melvin Ray Meyer, Cheri A. Meyerhofer, Nicholas Meyerhofer, Terry Meza, Joanne L. Michaels, Karen Michaels, Evelyn Miller, James Miller, Jane Miller, Kenneth Miller, Linda Miller, Merle Miller, Phyllis Susan Miller, Victor Miller, Robert Milliron, Norman Mills, Yefim Milter, Elie M. Mims, Norma C. Mims, John Ming, Sharon Ming, Christine Minton, Michael Minton, Gregory Moen, Marilyn R. Monson, Lequata Montgomery, William Montgomery, Richard Montreuil, Angelia Moore, Betty Moore, Marsha Moore, Phillip Ray Moore, Alan M. Morales, Helen Morales, Kathy Morales, Horace Dewayne Morgan, Sharlene Morgan, Megan Mork, Beverly Morrison, Kristin A. Morrow, Theresa Morton, Geraldine Mouyios, Naysa Mowell, William Mowell, David L. Mulcahy, Gabriella Mulcahy, Jennifer Murin, Andlle Naeter, Rita Nail, Anthony Neal, Mathew Neelley, Vivian Neelley, Elizabeth S. Neily, Shawna Nelson, Deborah Newton, Stephen Nichols, Mark Ronald Nord, Cynthia Nydegger, Seth Nydegger, Henry Earl O'Cain, Dan Offrell, Edward Oksienik, Rod Olsen, Muriel Olson, Shirley Orsinelli, Joseph C. Ortega, Rita L. Ortega, Michael Oseguera, John Otey, James Dirk Owens, Lisa Owens, Evelyn Pacheco, Richard Paes, Charles Palmer, Marilyn M. Palmer, Mark Palmer, Don Palow, Sharron Palow, Larry Parrish, Bobbie Patterson, Eileen Paul, Jeffrey Paul, John Payne, Susan Peil, Darius Perez, Frances C. Perkins, Jan Perry, Robert Perry, Darren Peterson, Pamela Peterson, Alexander Petrovic, Vivian Petrovic, Lavern Pfeiffer, Herman Phillips, Wanda Phillips, Christine Piper, David F. Piper, Tolling Agreement Plaintiffs, Charles Plungis, Diane Plungis, Christa Poindex
January 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2133 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Steven Wilson, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-2182-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
January 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2132 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Harold & Nancy Summers, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-3547-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
January 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2131 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Dennis Pryor, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-2179-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
January 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2130 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Muriel Olson, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-2167-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
January 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2129 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Alan Morales, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03677-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
January 19, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2128 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Marge Fredrickson, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-2781-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
January 19, 2018 Filing 2133 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Steven Wilson 1:15-cv-2182) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 19, 2018 Filing 2132 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Harold & Nancy Summers 1:13-cv-3547) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 19, 2018 Filing 2131 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dennis Pryor 1:15-cv-2179) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana) Modified on 1/19/2018 to edit text (ddm).
January 19, 2018 Filing 2130 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Muriel Olson 1:15-cv-2167) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 19, 2018 Filing 2129 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Alan Morales 1:13-cv-03677) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 19, 2018 Filing 2128 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marge Fredrickson 1:13-cv-2781) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2127 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Paul & Maria Sajeski, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01405-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2126 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Laurel & Kimball Young, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-03940-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2125 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Carole Vohs, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-02682-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2124 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Elizabeth Stone, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03766-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2123 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Patricia Anne Shea, Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-00651-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2122 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Joseph & Kathy Revak, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-2585-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2121 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Marilyn Katz, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-01875-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2120 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to George & Rosemary Fry, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03639-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing it own costs. (ddm)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2119 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Gina & Donald Friend 1:13-cv-01793-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2118 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Jerry Dennard, Jr., Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-3134-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2117 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Billy & Celia Cox, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-01304-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2116 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Florence & Dennis Christensen, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03833-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2115 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Gerald & Susan Case, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-03807-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing own costs. (ddm)
January 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2114 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Shalonda Bailey, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-1292-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2127 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Paul & Maria Sajeski 1:13-cv-01405) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2126 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Laurel & Kimball Young 1:16-cv-03940) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2125 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Carole Vohs 1:16-cv-02682) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2124 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Elizabeth Stone 1:13-cv-03766) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2123 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Patricia Anne Shea 1:17-cv-00651) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2122 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joseph & Kathy Revak (1:15-cv-2585) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2121 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marilyn Katz 1:16-cv-01875) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2120 STIPULATION of Dismissal (George & Rosemary Fry 1:13-cv-03639) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2119 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Gina & Donald Friend 1:13-cv-01793) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2118 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jerry Dennard, Jr. 1:12-cv-3134) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2117 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Billy & Celia Cox 1:12-cv-01304) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2116 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Florence & Dennis Christensen 1:13-cv-03833) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2115 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Gerald & Susan Case 1:14-cv-03807) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2114 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Shalonda Bailey 1:13-cv-1292) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 10, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2113 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Floren Shivitz, Civil Action NUmber 1:13-cv-00836-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
January 10, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2112 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Sheena Riley, Civil Action Number 1:3-cv-03640-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
January 10, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2111 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Linda Hyde, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01765-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
January 9, 2018 Filing 2113 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Floren Shivitz 1:13-cv-00836) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 9, 2018 Filing 2112 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Sheena Riley 1:3-cv-03640) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 9, 2018 Filing 2111 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Linda Hyde 1:13-cv-01765) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 8, 2018 Filing 2110 NOTICE by Mark Hoover of Related Action (Cook, James)
January 5, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2109 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Jane Duke, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03737-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
January 5, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2108 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Lester & Lori McDowell, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03729-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2109 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jane Duke 1:13-cv-03737) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2108 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Lester & Lori McDowell 1:13-cv-03729) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2107 ORDER directing that the cases of Moen v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc., No. 1:17-cv-4139-WSD and DeHoet v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc., No. 1:17-cv-4163-WSD be dismissed without prejudice. It is further ordered that the Clerk shall refund the attorneys the filing fees associated with filing of these short form complaints. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/2/18. (ddm)
December 27, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2103 Stipulation of Dismissal as to 1:13-cv-02750 (Frances Perkins) with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (sap)
December 27, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2102 Stipulation of Dismissal as to 1:13-cv-03170 (Hope Vogel & Charles Buettenmuller), #2104 Stipulation of Dismissal as to 1:12-cv-04311 (Brad Warren), #2105 Stipulation of Dismissal as to 1:15-cv-3336 (Judith Wilson), and #2106 Stipulation of Dismissal as to 1:13-cv-03228 (Winnie & Anthony Johnson) with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (sap)
December 26, 2017 Filing 2106 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Winnie & Anthony Johnson 1:13-cv-03228) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 26, 2017 Filing 2105 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Judith Wilson 1:15-cv-3336) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 26, 2017 Filing 2104 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Brad Warren 1:12-cv-04311) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 26, 2017 Filing 2103 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Frances Perkins 1:13-cv-02750) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 26, 2017 Filing 2102 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Hope Vogel & Charles Buettenmuller 1:13-cv-03170) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 26, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2098 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Deborah Newton 1:14-cv-01693, #2099 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Stephanie Wharton 1:13-cv-03892, #2100 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Larry Arnold 1:14-cv-02699, and #2101 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Bobby & Wendy Reppond 1:15-cv-1897, with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (hfm)
December 22, 2017 Filing 2101 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Bobby & Wendy Reppond 1:15-cv-1897) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 22, 2017 Filing 2100 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Larry Arnold 1:14-cv-02699) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 22, 2017 Filing 2099 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stephanie Wharton 1:13-cv-03892) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 22, 2017 Filing 2098 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Deborah Newton 1:14-cv-01693) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 20, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2097 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Larry Mason, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-1515-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
December 20, 2017 Filing 2097 STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by Larry Mason. (ddm)
December 20, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2096 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Roland Smith, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-04621-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
December 20, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2095 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Elizabeth Neily & Andrew Maizner, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-1270-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
December 20, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2094 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Jeannie & Perry Lansdell, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00108-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
December 20, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2093 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Gayle & Doug Cannady, Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-00833-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
December 20, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2092 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Stephen Brynelson, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-00108-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
December 20, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2091 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Joseph Brown, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-1389-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
December 20, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2090 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Karyn & Richard Bentlin, Civil Action Number 12:13-cv-01699-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
December 20, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2089 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Jimmie & Mary Baker, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-00598-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
December 20, 2017 Filing 2096 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Roland Smith 1:16-cv-04621) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 20, 2017 Filing 2095 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Elizabeth Neily & Andrew Maizner 1:14-cv-1270) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 20, 2017 Filing 2094 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jeannie & Perry Lansdell 1:14-cv-00108) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 20, 2017 Filing 2093 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Gayle & Doug Cannady 1:17-cv-00833) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 20, 2017 Filing 2092 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stephen Brynelson 1:16-cv-00108) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 20, 2017 Filing 2091 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joseph Brown 1:13-cv-1389) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 20, 2017 Filing 2090 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Karyn & Richard Bentlin 12:13-cv-01699) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 20, 2017 Filing 2089 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jimmie & Mary Baker 1:12-cv-00598) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 19, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2088 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to James McQuerry, Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-2112-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
December 19, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2087 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Charles & Patricia Hundt, Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-1777-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing their own costs and fees. (ddm)
December 18, 2017 Filing 2088 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James McQuerry 1:17-cv-2112) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 18, 2017 Filing 2087 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Charles & Patricia Hundt 1:17-cv-1777) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2086 ORDER. In accordance with the agreement among counsel set forth above, PCLC may, at its discretion, make pro rata distributions of common-benefit fees for legal services to the counsel listed above, in the amount of the allocation above, from the Legal Fees Funds that have been, and will be, collected via common-benefit assessments in MDL 2329. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 12/14/2017. (bgt)
December 14, 2017 Notification of Docket Correction re #2085 Order. Corrected document attached to docket entry. (bgt)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2085 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #2083 Motion for Extension of Time, up to and including 1/19/2018, for Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel to file the Status Report Concerning Cases Requiring Remand or Dismissal. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 12/14/2017. (bgt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2017: #1 Corrected Order) (bgt).
December 14, 2017 Filing 2084 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds from the registry of the Court Motion for Leave of Court to Distribute Common-Benefit Legal Fees Funds by Michael Abegg, Dennis Abts, Cathy Adams, Gerald Adams, Michael Shane Adams, Gaetano Aiello, Marjorie Aiello, David Albright, Elaine Albright, Deborah Aldrich, James Aldrich, Barbara A. Alexander, Johnnie Alexander, Willie Alexander, Catherine Allen, Danny Ray Allen, Michael XX Allen, Michael Allen, Michael Allen, Willa J. Allen, Samuel Ambler, Jacqueline Ames, Colleen Amirr, Joseph Amirr, Douglas F. Anderson, Janet B. Anderson, Ray Anderson, Sharon Anderson, Douglas Armstrong, Tammi Armstrong, Gene Arnold, Harvey Arnold, Joan Arnold, Karen Arnold, Larry Arnold, Judith Arvoy, Nancy Atherton, Lawrence Bachelder, Sherri Bacovsky, Steven J. Bacovsky, Ruth M. Bader, Shalonda Bailey, Jimmie Lee Baker, Laurel Baker, Mary Baker, Wayne Baker, Corey S. Barnard, Dorothy Jean Barnhouse, Otto Herbert Barnhouse, Carmela Barone, Giovanni Barone, Gail Bartels, John Bartels, Dorothy K. Barth, Ronald D. Barth, David Barton, Teresa Barwick, Allison Benson, Karyn Bentlin, Richard Bentlin, Heather A. Bianciotto, Gina Bianckino, Steven Birkson, Elizabeth Birmingham, Thomas E. Birmingham, Angelika Black, Norman Black, Pauline Blair, Karen Block, Hilda Blount, Bonnie Sue Bogert, Richard E. Bogert, David L. Bonham, Donald Bonkosky, John Borg, Terry Borg, Richard Robert Bourdeaux, Stephanie Bourdeaux, Donald Bowers, Patricia Bowers, Fred Braasch, Michaela Braasch, Randy Scott Bradshaw, Ray Bradshaw, Jr, Vickie Branham, Tandy Branham III, Cecil Brannan, Constance Brannan, Linda Bratcher, Larry A. Breeze, Valerie Brennan, Phyllis Brenneman, Hope Briggs, Robert L. Brock, Christine Catherine Brooks, Nicole Brooks, Doris Jean Brown, Joseph Brown, Letha Brown, Steven Brown, Sr, Arthur Bruce, Dorothy Bruce, Theresa Brunori, Stephen F. Brynelson, Janell Foster Bryson, Sheldon Buch, Charles W. Buettenmuller, Mary Burgart, Roger Burgart, John E. Burger, Cecil Burnett, David Burns, Saundra Burns, Jeffery Butler, Jeffrey E. Butler, Margreth C. Butterworth, James Button, Tessa Cain, William Cain, James Calvert, Sadie Calvert, Denise Calzada, John Campbell, Doug Cannady, Gayle Cannady, Nicholas Carl, Denise Carnegie, Sammy Carnegie, Edith Carnes, Frances Carter, Wanda Carter, Gerald G. Case, Gerald Case, Joann Case, Susan Case, Edward J. Cherveny, Annette Childs, Robert Lee Chisolm, Dennis Christensen, Florence Christensen, Gene Christiansen, Robyn Christiansen, John Christy, William Chrostowski, Tina Marie Cien, Joe A. Cienfuegos, Jr, Twyla Clarke, France Clausen, Mark A. Clausen, Cathleen Claussenius, Barry A. Cochran, Brenda Cochran, David Cochran, Diana C. Cochran, Eleda Cohen, Phyllis Coleman, Otis Collier, Mary Constantino, Leslee Cook, William Earl Cook, Jr, Joe Council, Mae Ellar Cowart, Billy Eugene Cox, Celia E. Cox, Patricia L. Croak, Richard B. Croak, Helen Crocker-Pope, Steven Cross, Carlodina J. Cruz, Eliel Cruz, Ernest Cummings, Kathryn Cummings, Nancy Cunningham, Samantha Curran, Dave Currens, Kay Currens, Margaret Curtis, GERALD DAUGHERTY, MARIANNE DAUGHERTY, Joey Daigle, Brian K. Dameron, Jo Dawn Danley, Richard Danley, Joann Daskivich, Michael Daskivich, Diona Davis, Ginger Davis, James E. Davis, Denise Davis-Reno, Brian M. Day, Patricia M. Day, Linda DeHoet, Cresencio DeJesus, Patricia DeJesus, Milton DeLair, Patricia DeLair, John R. DeWolf, Paula DeWolf, Cheri Dees, Jace Dees, Francine Degenhardt, Thomas Degenhardt, Jerry Dennard, Jr, Mary Destouet, Diane Deville, Roman Deville, Anne L. Dickerson, J'Renee Dickson, Lisa Diercksen, Ronald Diercksen, Ray Z. Dissinger, David Dockerty, Larry R. Dodd, Cheryl K. Doebrick, Robert J. Doebrick, Larry C. Dogs, Noreen M. Dogs, Nancy Dolensek, Kathleen Dougherty, Lawrence Dougherty, Jr, Katherine Douglas, Robert Douglas, Leilani Dow, Dennis M. Doyle, Kathleen A. Doyle, Janet E. Duecy, Jane Duke, Myron Dunn, Nancy Dunn, Rosemary Duvall, William Duvall, Doris Edelman, Sheldon Edelman, Ray Eigenbrode, Benjamin Eisenberg, Marilyn Eisenberg, Larita Elias, Mervin Elias, Kathy L. Eliason, Arthur E. Elliott, Leah Elshaug, Shane Elshaug, Lisa Elston, Michael Feinberg, Douglas Feld, Nancie Feld, June Feldman, Fred W. Fewell, Martha J. Fewell, James Fields, Linda Fields, Alberto Fierro, Ann Fillmore, Ben Fillmore, Amy Fine, Steven Fine, Pauline Finstad, Robert Finstad, Linda M. Fishel, Stephen M. Fishel, Shirley Fisher, Linda K. Floyd, Shirley Foliart, Shirley Foliart, Margie J. Fredrickson, Craig J. Freebersyser, Janice M. Freebersyser, Jerry French, Nicole M. Frey, Donald Friend, Gina Friend, George Fry, Jr, Rosemary Fry, Thomas Gadbois, Authelia Gallman, Bertha Gamble, Gary Gamble, Cynthia Gandy, Patrick Gandy, Shelley Garbes, James Henry Garcia, Diane Gebhart, Robert A. Gebhart, II, Robert Giacometti, Sally Giacometti, Deborah L. Giasson, Guy P. Giasson, Michael Glassco, Nancy A. Gleim, William R. Gleim, Hiram Glenn, Jr, Donald Gobel, John Goromboly, Glen Graves, Harold L. Graves, Sandra R. Graves, Roger Gray, Kevin L. Greenfield, Wanda Greenfield, Janne C. Gregoire, Richard Gregoire, Lisa Griego, Mark Griffin, Margaret Groff, Phillip Groff, Henry Gross, Mary Grossbier, Gerald Gubanski, Fabian Guillen, Janet M. Gunter, Betty L. Hall, Dianne A. Hall, Janice L. Hall, Peter A. Hall, Raymond E. Hall, James Carter Hamilton, Kelley Renee Hamilton, Gregory Rothmere Hamlin, Mark Hammond, Cherie M. Hanks, Wilda J. Harbison, Dorothy J. Hardy, Richard C. Hardy, Frances Harmon, Happy Harrington, James Harris, June Harrison, Reginald Harrison, Paula Hartwell, Thomas Harward, Valerie Harward, Valerie Hasely, Jean B. Hastings, Robert L. Hastings, William Haverly, Larry Hawkins, Earl J. Hebert, Linda Hebert, Mary Heldenbrand, Harold Henderson, Jr, Judith A. Hendrix, Linda R. Hepner, David Herold, Kathleen Herold, Eric Herzog, Judith Ann Hildebrand, Ricky Hill, Royal Lee Hines, Patricia Hinrichs, Timothy Hinrichs, Darrell Hirsch, Julie Hobert, Irwin Hoffman, Jacqueline A. Hoffman, Theresa J. Hohenberger, Gloria Hollenbeck, James V. Holmes, Percy Holmes, Terry Homer, Henry R. Hooker, Naomi E. Hooker, Nancy Hoover, Bobby Gene Horine, Patricia Diane Horine, Jimmy Horton, Helen R. Hribar, Lyle Huisinga, Tracey Huisinga, Charles Edward Hundt, Carol Hutchinson, Charles Hutchinson, Linda Hyde, James Igoe, David Ishmael, Lisa Ishmael, Donna Jackson, Harry Jacobs, Danny L. James, Sr, Gail Jansen, David Jaramillo, Coleman Jarrett, Paula Jarrett, Venetia Jarrett, Patricia Jeffers, Marlene A. Jennings, Ross Jennings, James Jensen, Pamela Jerzak, Anthony Johnson, Celeste Johnson, Emma Jean Johnson, Eric C. Johnson, James Johnson, Karen J. Johnson, Kathleen Minadeo Johnson, Kathy Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Nancy C. Johnson, Norma Johnson, Sharon M. Johnson, Winnie Johnson, Jerry L. Johnson, Sr, Francine Mecca Jonas, Ronald Jonas, Donald Jones, Evelyn Jones, Frederick W. Jones, John C. Jurgerson, Denise Kabisch, Marilyn Katz, Carole Kearn, Nikki Kellogg, William Kellogg, Mauryce Kennon, Ronald Kimsey, Harry D Kinard, Sharon Ginger Kinard, Naomi Kingery, Roger Kingery, Taleeea Isaphine Kinsey, Lisa M. Kirk, David Kirkley, Dianna Kirkley, Larry Koenig, Tamara Koenig, Debra Korszeniewski, Nancy L. Koul, Melvin Kruse, Joseph A. LaRue, Joseph Abel LaRue, Jr, Joseph Abel LaRue, Jr, Cheryl Lachance, Donna M. Lalk, Jeannie Lansdell, Perry Lansdell, Anthony Laron, Diane Lattimore, David Lavares, Sheryl Lawman, Michael Lee, David R. Leitner, Joan M. Leitner, Dolores Lentine, Robert Lentine, Barbara Leonard, Franklin Lester, Lanny Long, Ruth Ann Long, Tamara Loosle, Edna Lopez, Joe F. Lopez, Roy Gene Lyles, Kathy Lyons, Richard Lyons, Bruce MacGurn, Cathy MacGurn, Andrew Maizner, Alan Maltin, Connie Maltin, Deborah Mancill, Peter Mancill, Barry Mang, Kim Elizabeth Manning, Sandra March, Robert Marchlewicz, Frank Marin, Paul Marino, Paul J. Marino, Judith Marketos, Beverly Marshall, Billy Marshall, Olga L. Martin, Terry D. Martin, Kristine M. Mason, Larry Mason, George Mattison, Linda Mattison, Mary McClarity, Katherine M. McClellan, Vera McClelland, Brian McCormick, Dorothea McCormick, S. Michael McCormick, Jammie McCovery, Shirley Ann McCright, Lester E. McDowell, Kathy McGee, Anita McGrady, Michael McGrady, D. Scott McIntosh, Joshua McIntosh, Marguerita C. McIntosh, Marvin R. McIntosh, Sharon McMahon, Sharon McMahon, James McQuerry, Martin Mead, Russell Meier, Mary Ann Meiling, Phillip Meiling, Dale Susan Meltzer, William Allan Menne, Martin Metzger, Hendrick Meuzelaar, Pieternella Meuzelaar, Carol Sue Meyer, Melvin Ray Meyer, Cheri A. Meyerhofer, Nicholas Meyerhofer, Terry Meza, Joanne L. Michaels, Karen Michaels, Evelyn Miller, James Miller, Jane Miller, Kenneth Miller, Linda Miller, Merle Miller, Phyllis Susan Miller, Victor Miller, Robert Milliron, Norman Mills, Yefim Milter, Elie M. Mims, Norma C. Mims, John Ming, Sharon Ming, Christine Minton, Michael Minton, Gregory Moen, Marilyn R. Monson, Lequata Montgomery, William Montgomery, Richard Montreuil, Angelia Moore, Betty Moore, Marsha Moore, Phillip Ray Moore, Alan M. Morales, Helen Morales, Kathy Morales, Horace Dewayne Morgan, Sharlene Morgan, Megan Mork, Beverly Morrison, Kristin A. Morrow, Theresa Morton, Geraldine Mouyios, Naysa Mowell, William Mowell, David L. Mulcahy, Gabriella Mulcahy, Jennifer Murin, Andlle Naeter, Rita Nail, Anthony Neal, Mathew Neelley, Vivian Neelley, Elizabeth S. Neily, Shawna Nelson, Deborah Newton, Stephen Nichols, Mark Ronald Nord, Cynthia Nydegger, Seth Nydegger, Henry Earl O'Cain, Dan Offrell, Edward Oksienik, Rod Olsen, Muriel Olson, Shirley Orsinelli, Joseph C. Ortega, Rita L. Ortega, Michael Oseguera, John Otey, James Dirk Owens, Lisa Owens, Evelyn Pacheco, Richard Paes, Charles Palmer, Marilyn M. Palmer, Mark Palmer, Don Palow, Sharron Palow, Larry Parrish, Bobbie Patterson, Eileen Paul, Jeffrey Paul, John Payne, Susan Peil, Darius Perez, Frances C. Perkins, Jan Perry, Robert Perry, Darren Peterson, Pamela Peterson, Alexander Petrovic, Vivian Petrovic, Lavern Pfeiffer, Herman Phillips, Wanda Phillips, Christine Piper, David F. Piper, Tolling Agreement Plaintiffs, Charles Plungis, Diane Plungis, Christa Poindexter, Angela Pokorny, Oscar C. Pokorny
December 14, 2017 Filing 2083 MOTION for Extension of Time re: #2017 Order,,, Set Submission Deadline,, Motion to Continue Deadline for Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel's Status Report Concerning Cases Requiring Remand or Dismissal by Michael Abegg, Dennis Abts, Cathy Adams, Gerald Adams, Michael Shane Adams, Gaetano Aiello, Marjorie Aiello, David Albright, Elaine Albright, Deborah Aldrich, James Aldrich, Barbara A. Alexander, Johnnie Alexander, Willie Alexander, Catherine Allen, Danny Ray Allen, Michael XX Allen, Michael Allen, Michael Allen, Willa J. Allen, Samuel Ambler, Jacqueline Ames, Colleen Amirr, Joseph Amirr, Douglas F. Anderson, Janet B. Anderson, Ray Anderson, Sharon Anderson, Douglas Armstrong, Tammi Armstrong, Gene Arnold, Harvey Arnold, Joan Arnold, Karen Arnold, Larry Arnold, Judith Arvoy, Nancy Atherton, Lawrence Bachelder, Sherri Bacovsky, Steven J. Bacovsky, Ruth M. Bader, Shalonda Bailey, Jimmie Lee Baker, Laurel Baker, Mary Baker, Wayne Baker, Corey S. Barnard, Dorothy Jean Barnhouse, Otto Herbert Barnhouse, Carmela Barone, Giovanni Barone, Gail Bartels, John Bartels, Dorothy K. Barth, Ronald D. Barth, David Barton, Teresa Barwick, Allison Benson, Karyn Bentlin, Richard Bentlin, Heather A. Bianciotto, Gina Bianckino, Steven Birkson, Elizabeth Birmingham, Thomas E. Birmingham, Angelika Black, Norman Black, Pauline Blair, Karen Block, Hilda Blount, Bonnie Sue Bogert, Richard E. Bogert, David L. Bonham, Donald Bonkosky, John Borg, Terry Borg, Richard Robert Bourdeaux, Stephanie Bourdeaux, Donald Bowers, Patricia Bowers, Fred Braasch, Michaela Braasch, Randy Scott Bradshaw, Ray Bradshaw, Jr, Vickie Branham, Tandy Branham III, Cecil Brannan, Constance Brannan, Linda Bratcher, Larry A. Breeze, Valerie Brennan, Phyllis Brenneman, Hope Briggs, Robert L. Brock, Christine Catherine Brooks, Nicole Brooks, Doris Jean Brown, Joseph Brown, Letha Brown, Steven Brown, Sr, Arthur Bruce, Dorothy Bruce, Theresa Brunori, Stephen F. Brynelson, Janell Foster Bryson, Sheldon Buch, Charles W. Buettenmuller, Mary Burgart, Roger Burgart, John E. Burger, Cecil Burnett, David Burns, Saundra Burns, Jeffery Butler, Jeffrey E. Butler, Margreth C. Butterworth, James Button, Tessa Cain, William Cain, James Calvert, Sadie Calvert, Denise Calzada, John Campbell, Doug Cannady, Gayle Cannady, Nicholas Carl, Denise Carnegie, Sammy Carnegie, Edith Carnes, Frances Carter, Wanda Carter, Gerald G. Case, Gerald Case, Joann Case, Susan Case, Edward J. Cherveny, Annette Childs, Robert Lee Chisolm, Dennis Christensen, Florence Christensen, Gene Christiansen, Robyn Christiansen, John Christy, William Chrostowski, Tina Marie Cien, Joe A. Cienfuegos, Jr, Twyla Clarke, France Clausen, Mark A. Clausen, Cathleen Claussenius, Barry A. Cochran, Brenda Cochran, David Cochran, Diana C. Cochran, Eleda Cohen, Phyllis Coleman, Otis Collier, Mary Constantino, Leslee Cook, William Earl Cook, Jr, Joe Council, Mae Ellar Cowart, Billy Eugene Cox, Celia E. Cox, Patricia L. Croak, Richard B. Croak, Helen Crocker-Pope, Steven Cross, Carlodina J. Cruz, Eliel Cruz, Ernest Cummings, Kathryn Cummings, Nancy Cunningham, Samantha Curran, Dave Currens, Kay Currens, Margaret Curtis, GERALD DAUGHERTY, MARIANNE DAUGHERTY, Joey Daigle, Brian K. Dameron, Jo Dawn Danley, Richard Danley, Joann Daskivich, Michael Daskivich, Diona Davis, Ginger Davis, James E. Davis, Denise Davis-Reno, Brian M. Day, Patricia M. Day, Linda DeHoet, Cresencio DeJesus, Patricia DeJesus, Milton DeLair, Patricia DeLair, John R. DeWolf, Paula DeWolf, Cheri Dees, Jace Dees, Francine Degenhardt, Thomas Degenhardt, Jerry Dennard, Jr, Mary Destouet, Diane Deville, Roman Deville, Anne L. Dickerson, J'Renee Dickson, Lisa Diercksen, Ronald Diercksen, Ray Z. Dissinger, David Dockerty, Larry R. Dodd, Cheryl K. Doebrick, Robert J. Doebrick, Larry C. Dogs, Noreen M. Dogs, Nancy Dolensek, Kathleen Dougherty, Lawrence Dougherty, Jr, Katherine Douglas, Robert Douglas, Leilani Dow, Dennis M. Doyle, Kathleen A. Doyle, Janet E. Duecy, Jane Duke, Myron Dunn, Nancy Dunn, Rosemary Duvall, William Duvall, Doris Edelman, Sheldon Edelman, Ray Eigenbrode, Benjamin Eisenberg, Marilyn Eisenberg, Larita Elias, Mervin Elias, Kathy L. Eliason, Arthur E. Elliott, Leah Elshaug, Shane Elshaug, Lisa Elston, Michael Feinberg, Douglas Feld, Nancie Feld, June Feldman, Fred W. Fewell, Martha J. Fewell, James Fields, Linda Fields, Alberto Fierro, Ann Fillmore, Ben Fillmore, Amy Fine, Steven Fine, Pauline Finstad, Robert Finstad, Linda M. Fishel, Stephen M. Fishel, Shirley Fisher, Linda K. Floyd, Shirley Foliart, Shirley Foliart, Margie J. Fredrickson, Craig J. Freebersyser, Janice M. Freebersyser, Jerry French, Nicole M. Frey, Donald Friend, Gina Friend, George Fry, Jr, Rosemary Fry, Thomas Gadbois, Authelia Gallman, Bertha Gamble, Gary Gamble, Cynthia Gandy, Patrick Gandy, Shelley Garbes, James Henry Garcia, Diane Gebhart, Robert A. Gebhart, II, Robert Giacometti, Sally Giacometti, Deborah L. Giasson, Guy P. Giasson, Michael Glassco, Nancy A. Gleim, William R. Gleim, Hiram Glenn, Jr, Donald Gobel, John Goromboly, Glen Graves, Harold L. Graves, Sandra R. Graves, Roger Gray, Kevin L. Greenfield, Wanda Greenfield, Janne C. Gregoire, Richard Gregoire, Lisa Griego, Mark Griffin, Margaret Groff, Phillip Groff, Henry Gross, Mary Grossbier, Gerald Gubanski, Fabian Guillen, Janet M. Gunter, Betty L. Hall, Dianne A. Hall, Janice L. Hall, Peter A. Hall, Raymond E. Hall, James Carter Hamilton, Kelley Renee Hamilton, Gregory Rothmere Hamlin, Mark Hammond, Cherie M. Hanks, Wilda J. Harbison, Dorothy J. Hardy, Richard C. Hardy, Frances Harmon, Happy Harrington, James Harris, June Harrison, Reginald Harrison, Paula Hartwell, Thomas Harward, Valerie Harward, Valerie Hasely, Jean B. Hastings, Robert L. Hastings, William Haverly, Larry Hawkins, Earl J. Hebert, Linda Hebert, Mary Heldenbrand, Harold Henderson, Jr, Judith A. Hendrix, Linda R. Hepner, David Herold, Kathleen Herold, Eric Herzog, Judith Ann Hildebrand, Ricky Hill, Royal Lee Hines, Patricia Hinrichs, Timothy Hinrichs, Darrell Hirsch, Julie Hobert, Irwin Hoffman, Jacqueline A. Hoffman, Theresa J. Hohenberger, Gloria Hollenbeck, James V. Holmes, Percy Holmes, Terry Homer, Henry R. Hooker, Naomi E. Hooker, Nancy Hoover, Bobby Gene Horine, Patricia Diane Horine, Jimmy Horton, Helen R. Hribar, Lyle Huisinga, Tracey Huisinga, Charles Edward Hundt, Carol Hutchinson, Charles Hutchinson, Linda Hyde, James Igoe, David Ishmael, Lisa Ishmael, Donna Jackson, Harry Jacobs, Danny L. James, Sr, Gail Jansen, David Jaramillo, Coleman Jarrett, Paula Jarrett, Venetia Jarrett, Patricia Jeffers, Marlene A. Jennings, Ross Jennings, James Jensen, Pamela Jerzak, Anthony Johnson, Celeste Johnson, Emma Jean Johnson, Eric C. Johnson, James Johnson, Karen J. Johnson, Kathleen Minadeo Johnson, Kathy Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Nancy C. Johnson, Norma Johnson, Sharon M. Johnson, Winnie Johnson, Jerry L. Johnson, Sr, Francine Mecca Jonas, Ronald Jonas, Donald Jones, Evelyn Jones, Frederick W. Jones, John C. Jurgerson, Denise Kabisch, Marilyn Katz, Carole Kearn, Nikki Kellogg, William Kellogg, Mauryce Kennon, Ronald Kimsey, Harry D Kinard, Sharon Ginger Kinard, Naomi Kingery, Roger Kingery, Taleeea Isaphine Kinsey, Lisa M. Kirk, David Kirkley, Dianna Kirkley, Larry Koenig, Tamara Koenig, Debra Korszeniewski, Nancy L. Koul, Melvin Kruse, Joseph A. LaRue, Joseph Abel LaRue, Jr, Joseph Abel LaRue, Jr, Cheryl Lachance, Donna M. Lalk, Jeannie Lansdell, Perry Lansdell, Anthony Laron, Diane Lattimore, David Lavares, Sheryl Lawman, Michael Lee, David R. Leitner, Joan M. Leitner, Dolores Lentine, Robert Lentine, Barbara Leonard, Franklin Lester, Lanny Long, Ruth Ann Long, Tamara Loosle, Edna Lopez, Joe F. Lopez, Roy Gene Lyles, Kathy Lyons, Richard Lyons, Bruce MacGurn, Cathy MacGurn, Andrew Maizner, Alan Maltin, Connie Maltin, Deborah Mancill, Peter Mancill, Barry Mang, Kim Elizabeth Manning, Sandra March, Robert Marchlewicz, Frank Marin, Paul Marino, Paul J. Marino, Judith Marketos, Beverly Marshall, Billy Marshall, Olga L. Martin, Terry D. Martin, Kristine M. Mason, Larry Mason, George Mattison, Linda Mattison, Mary McClarity, Katherine M. McClellan, Vera McClelland, Brian McCormick, Dorothea McCormick, S. Michael McCormick, Jammie McCovery, Shirley Ann McCright, Lester E. McDowell, Kathy McGee, Anita McGrady, Michael McGrady, D. Scott McIntosh, Joshua McIntosh, Marguerita C. McIntosh, Marvin R. McIntosh, Sharon McMahon, Sharon McMahon, James McQuerry, Martin Mead, Russell Meier, Mary Ann Meiling, Phillip Meiling, Dale Susan Meltzer, William Allan Menne, Martin Metzger, Hendrick Meuzelaar, Pieternella Meuzelaar, Carol Sue Meyer, Melvin Ray Meyer, Cheri A. Meyerhofer, Nicholas Meyerhofer, Terry Meza, Joanne L. Michaels, Karen Michaels, Evelyn Miller, James Miller, Jane Miller, Kenneth Miller, Linda Miller, Merle Miller, Phyllis Susan Miller, Victor Miller, Robert Milliron, Norman Mills, Yefim Milter, Elie M. Mims, Norma C. Mims, John Ming, Sharon Ming, Christine Minton, Michael Minton, Gregory Moen, Marilyn R. Monson, Lequata Montgomery, William Montgomery, Richard Montreuil, Angelia Moore, Betty Moore, Marsha Moore, Phillip Ray Moore, Alan M. Morales, Helen Morales, Kathy Morales, Horace Dewayne Morgan, Sharlene Morgan, Megan Mork, Beverly Morrison, Kristin A. Morrow, Theresa Morton, Geraldine Mouyios, Naysa Mowell, William Mowell, David L. Mulcahy, Gabriella Mulcahy, Jennifer Murin, Andlle Naeter, Rita Nail, Anthony Neal, Mathew Neelley, Vivian Neelley, Elizabeth S. Neily, Shawna Nelson, Deborah Newton, Stephen Nichols, Mark Ronald Nord, Cynthia Nydegger, Seth Nydegger, Henry Earl O'Cain, Dan Offrell, Edward Oksienik, Rod Olsen, Muriel Olson, Shirley Orsinelli, Joseph C. Ortega, Rita L. Ortega, Michael Oseguera, John Otey, James Dirk Owens, Lisa Owens, Evelyn Pacheco, Richard Paes, Charles Palmer, Marilyn M. Palmer, Mark Palmer, Don Palow, Sharron Palow, Larry Parrish, Bobbie Patterson, Eileen Paul, Jeffrey Paul, John Payne, Susan Peil, Darius Perez, Frances C. Perkins, Jan Perry, Robert Perry, Darren Peterson, Pamela Peterson, Alexander Petrovic, Vivian Petrovic, Lavern Pfeiffer, Herman Phillips, Wanda Phillips, Christine Piper, David F. Piper, Tolling Agreement Plaintiffs, Charles Plungis, Diane
December 13, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2082 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
December 13, 2017 Filing 2082 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dale Yocum 1:14-cv-03174) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana) Modified on 12/13/2017 to edit docket text (ddm).
December 7, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2080 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Annette Childs, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01191-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own fees and costs. (ddm)
December 7, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2079 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Fabian & Alma Guillen, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03482-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own fees and costs. (ddm)
December 7, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2078 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Robert L. Richards, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03248-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
December 7, 2017 Filing 2081 SHORT FORM ANSWER to #2018 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand of MARK GRIFFIN (1:17-cv-03989-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated.(Ash, Dana) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 6, 2017 Filing 2080 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Annette Childs 1:13-cv-01191) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 6, 2017 Filing 2079 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Fabian & Alma Guillen 1:13-cv-03482) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 6, 2017 Filing 2078 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Robert L. Richards 1:13-cv-03248) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (8 in 1:14-cv-02953-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal of LINDA D. ROGERS pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:14-cv-02953-WSD(jkl)
December 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (12 in 1:13-cv-01566-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal by DUANE ROBBINS, (2076 in 1:12-md-02329-WSD ). Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:13-cv-01566-WSD(jkl)
December 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING (2077 in 1:12-md-02329-WSD) Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). Plaintiffs SCOTT JEFFREY PORTER AND JOANNE P. PORTER dismissed. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:12-cv-03712-WSD(jkl)
December 1, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2076 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Richard & Kathy Lyons, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-03053-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
December 1, 2017 Filing 2077 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Scott & Joanne Porter 1:12-cv-03712) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
December 1, 2017 Filing 2076 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Richard & Kathy Lyons 1:15-cv-03053) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 30, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2075 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Timothy Poling, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-1255-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 30, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2074 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Darren & Pamela Peterson, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-3466-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 30, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2073 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Alexander & Vivian Petrovic, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02113-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 30, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2072 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Diane and Charlie Plungis, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-0123-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 30, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2070 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Brenda G. Smith, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-00317-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 30, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2069 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Jushonna Staten, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-0947-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 30, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2068 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Bernard & Silvia Sterling, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-02456-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 30, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2067 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Michael & Twila Sullivan, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-03321-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 30, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2066 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Billy & Lois Thomas, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00848-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 30, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2065 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Richard Watson 1:14-cv-04116-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 30, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2064 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Thomas Marvin York, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00043-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 30, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2071 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Marlene & Ronald Saponic, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-4220-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2075 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Timothy Poling 1:12-cv-1255) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2074 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Darren & Pamela Peterson 1:14-cv-3466) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2073 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Alexander & Vivian Petrovic 1:14-cv-02113) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2072 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Diane and Charlie Plungis 1:13-cv-0123) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2071 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marlene & Ronald Saponic 1:12-cv-4220) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2070 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Brenda G. Smith 1:16-cv-00317) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2069 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jushonna Staten 1:14-cv-0947) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2068 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Bernard & Silvia Sterling 1:15-cv-02456) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2067 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Michael & Twila Sullivan 1:15-cv-03321) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2066 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Billy & Lois Thomas 1:13-cv-00848) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2065 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Richard Watson 1:14-cv-04116) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2064 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Thomas Marvin York 1:15-cv-00043) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2063 SHORT FORM ANSWER to #2004 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand of J'RENEE DICKSON (1:17-cv-03842-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated.(Ash, Dana) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2062 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Doris & Sheldon Edelman, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-03368-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2061 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Helen Morales, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00270-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2060 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Robert Milliron, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00862-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2059 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Terry Meza, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02429-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2058 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Mary Ann & Phillip Meiling, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-0157-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2057 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Dorothea & S. Michael McCormick, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02390-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2056 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Roy Gene Lyles, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-0912-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2054 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Kathy Johnson, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-0933-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2053 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Marlene A. & Ross T. Jennings, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-4235-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2052 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Donna Jackson, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-03207-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2051 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Harold Henderson, Jr., Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-00759-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2050 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to James Harris, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03884-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2049 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Mary Grossbier, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-01642-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2048 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Michael Glassco, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01354-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2047 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Gary & Bertha Gamble, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-02165-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2046 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Alberto Fierro, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-02870-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2045 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Martha J. & Fred W. Fewell, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-3546-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2044 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Ray Eigenbrode, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-2752-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2043 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Katherine & Robert Douglas, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03107-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2042 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Margaret Curtis, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03072-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2055 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Debra A. Korzeniewski, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-00766-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2062 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Doris & Sheldon Edelman 1:15-cv-03368) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2061 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Helen Morales 1:13-cv-00270) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2060 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Robert Milliron 1:14-cv-00862) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2059 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Terry Meza 1:14-cv-02429) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2058 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Mary Ann & Phillip Meiling 1:16-cv-0157) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2057 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dorothea & S. Michael McCormick 1:13-cv-02390) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2056 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Roy Gene Lyles (1:15-cv-0912) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2055 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Debra A. Korzeniewski 1:12-cv-00766) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2054 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Kathy Johnson 1:13-cv-0933) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2053 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marlene A. & Ross T. Jennings 1:13-cv-4235) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2052 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Donna Jackson 1:16-cv-03207) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2051 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Harold Henderson, Jr. 1:16-cv-00759) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2050 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James Harris 1:13-cv-03884) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2049 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Mary Grossbier 1:15-cv-01642) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2048 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Michael Glassco 1:13-cv-01354) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2047 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Gary & Bertha Gamble 1:15-cv-02165) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2046 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Alberto Fierro 1:15-cv-02870) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2045 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Martha J. & Fred W. Fewell 1:13-cv-3546) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2044 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ray Eigenbrode 1:13-cv-2752) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2043 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Katherine & Robert Douglas 1:12-cv-03107) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2042 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Margaret Curtis 1:12-cv-03072) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 15, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2041 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Jeffery Butler, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01821-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 15, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2040 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Saundra Burns and David Burns, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-04307-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 15, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2039 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Letha Brown, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-1142-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 15, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2038 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Linda Bratcher, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-01404-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 15, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2037 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Karen Block, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-04052-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 15, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2036 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Teresa & Ron Barwick, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-1141-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 15, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2035 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Douglas & Tammi Armstrong, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00406-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 15, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2034 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Samuel Ambler & Edward Rubin, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03081-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 15, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2033 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Michael Shane & Cathy Adams, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02280-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 15, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2032 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Gerald & Nancy Adams, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02639-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2041 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jeffery Butler 1:13-cv-01821) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2040 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Saundra Burns and David Burns 1:13-cv-04307) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2039 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Letha Brown 1:13-cv-1142) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2038 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Linda Bratcher 1:16-cv-01404) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2037 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Karen Block 1:14-cv-04052) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2036 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Teresa & Ron Barwick 1:13-cv-1141) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2035 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Douglas & Tammi Armstrong 1:14-cv-00406) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2034 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Samuel Ambler & Edward Rubin 1:13-cv-03081) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2033 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Michael Shane & Cathy Adams 1:14-cv-02280) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2032 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Gerald & Nancy Adams 1:14-cv-02639) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
November 8, 2017 Filing 2031 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca C. Brightwell on behalf of Deborah Mancill, Peter Mancill. (ddm)
October 30, 2017 Filing 2030 SHORT FORM ANSWER to #2016 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand of BARBARA LEONARD (17-cv-03918) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated.(Ash, Dana) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 25, 2017 Clerks Certificate of Mailing to all attorneys not receiving electronic copy re #2029 Order. (bnw)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2029 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #2026 and #2027 , indicating the filing of short-form complaints, are for record purposes only. The short-form complaints filed as Docket #2026 and #2027 were prohibited from being filed in this action and are not complaints in this MDL. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 10/24/17. (bnw)
October 23, 2017 Filing 2028 STIPULATION of Dismissal (JOINT) and Satisfaction of Judgment (Robyn Christiansen 13-cv-00297-WSD) by Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 19, 2017 Filing 2027 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Linda DeHoet. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-4163-WSD) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 18, 2017 Filing 2026 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Gregory Moen. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-4139-WSD) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 18, 2017 Clerks Certificate of Mailing to all attorneys not receiving electronic copy re [2022,2023] Orders. (ddm)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2023 ORDER respectfully suggesting that the JPML decline to transfer any additional cases to MDL-2329. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 10/18/17. (ddm)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2022 ORDER granting the parties' #2020 Joint Motion to Close the MDL to New Claims and vacates the CMO-1 to the extent that it allowed direct filings, using the approved short-form complaint or otherwise. The direct filing of new cases is no longer permitted in MDL-2329. The Court will advise the JPML of the settlement of these actions and suggest that no further cases be transferred to MDL-2329 by the JPML. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 10/18/17. (ddm)
October 17, 2017 Filing 2025 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Cynthia Nydegger, Seth Nydegger. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-4114-WSD) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 17, 2017 Filing 2024 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Dorothy K. Barth, Ronald D. Barth. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-4113-WSD) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 17, 2017 Filing 2021 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Lisa Griego, David Jaramillo. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-4112-WSD) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 17, 2017 Filing 2020 Joint MOTION to Close MDL to New Claims #2017 Order,,, Set Submission Deadline,, by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ash, Dana)
October 17, 2017 Filing 2019 SHORT FORM ANSWER to #1959 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand of MARSHA MOORE (17-cv-03637) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated.(Ash, Dana) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 10, 2017 Filing 2018 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Mark Griffin. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-3989-WSD) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 10, 2017 Clerks Certificate of Mailing to all attorneys not receiving an electronic copy re #2017 Order. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (ddm)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2017 ORDER directing that Plaintiff's Co-Lead Counsel shall, on or before December 8, 2017, file a status report updating the Court as to which cases, if any, it has identified requiring remand or dismissal and, during this sixty (60) day period, shall provide progress reports every three weeks regarding the status of cases designated to be dismissed in the Second and Third Settlement Agreements. It is further ordered that the parties promptly file their motion requesting to close the MDL to new claims, including a discussion of the authority, and the process required, for requesting the MDL panel not to refer further tagalong actions. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 10/6/17. (ddm)
October 5, 2017 Filing 2016 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Barbara Leonard. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-3918-WSD) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 5, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2014 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Valerie Hasely, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-3587-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
October 5, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2013 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Paula Hartwell, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-3005-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
October 5, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2012 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Cherie Hanks, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-2026-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
October 5, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2010 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Mervin Elias & Larita Elias, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-3416-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
October 5, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2009 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Brian M. Day & Patricia M. Day, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-1131-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its costs. (ddm)
October 5, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2008 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Ginger Davis, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-0797-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
October 5, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2007 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Brian K. Dameron & Andrea Dameron, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-4151-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
October 5, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2006 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Patricia L. Croak & Richard B. Croak, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-3060-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
October 5, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2011 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Janet M. Gunter, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-2571-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
October 5, 2017 Filing 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: Status Conference held in Chambers on 10/5/2017. (Court Reporter Nicholas A. Marrone)(ddm)
October 5, 2017 Filing 2014 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Valerie Hasely, 13-cv-3587) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 5, 2017 Filing 2013 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Paula Hartwell, 15-cv-3005) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 5, 2017 Filing 2012 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Cherie Hanks, 14-cv-2026) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 5, 2017 Filing 2011 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Janet M. Gunter, 12-cv-2571) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 5, 2017 Filing 2010 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Mervin Elias & Larita Elias, 13-cv-3416) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 5, 2017 Filing 2009 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Brian M. Day & Patricia M. Day, 13-cv-1131) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 5, 2017 Filing 2008 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ginger Davis, 15-cv-0797) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 5, 2017 Filing 2007 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Brian K. Dameron & Andrea Dameron, 14-cv-4151) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 5, 2017 Filing 2006 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Patricia L. Croak & Richard B. Croak, 16-cv-3060) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 3, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2005 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Marjorie Satterthwait, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01715-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
October 3, 2017 Filing 2005 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marjorie Satterthwait 1:13-cv-01715) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2004 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by J'Renee Dickson. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-3842-WSD) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Waiver)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 29, 2017 Filing 2003 NOTICE by John Calvin White Motion to Remove from Service List (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sileo, John)
September 29, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2001 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Grace Zimmerman, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-01066-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 29, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2000 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Ruth and Kenneth Ziegler, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00125-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 29, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1999 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Glynn Lee and Lynn Zeigler, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00374-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 29, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1998 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Robert G. and Cheryl D. Yoakum, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02559-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 29, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1997 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Antoine Tureaud, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-00318-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 29, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1996 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Mary Vicki and Gilbert Tanguma, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-03531-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 29, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #2002 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Keisha and Frank L. Zwald, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03563-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2002 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Keisha and Frank L. Zwald 1:12-cv-03563) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2001 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Grace Zimmerman 1:15-cv-01066) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2000 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ruth and Kenneth Ziegler 1:13-cv-00125) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1999 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Glynn Lee and Lynn Zeigler 1:14-cv-00374) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1998 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Robert G. and Cheryl D. Yoakum 1:13-cv-02559) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1997 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Antoine Tureaud 1:16-cv-00318) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1996 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Mary Vicki and Gilbert Tanguma 1:16-cv-03531) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1995 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Janne C. and Richard Gregoire, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03169-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1994 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Virginia Ann and Robert Leroy Snyder, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01456-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1993 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Teresa E, and Tony Mark Sellers, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02653-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1992 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Charles and Pamela Schwartz, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00040-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1991 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Norma and Ben Sanders, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00175-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1990 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Mary Louise and Bobby J. Proctor, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-3815-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1989 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Cheryl K. and Carl Prange, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00633-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1988 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Geraldine Mouyios, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-02767-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1987 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Sharlene Morgan, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03075-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1986 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Angelia Moore, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03757-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1985 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Yefim Milter, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-02130-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1984 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Frank and Jeanne Marin, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-04126-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1983 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Bruce and Cathy MacGurn, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-01842-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1981 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Terry L. Linkemer, Civil Action Number 1:16-cv-2942-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1980 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Ronald V. and Francine Mecca-Jonas, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03079-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1979 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to James Jensen, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00848-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1978 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Venetia Jarrett, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00621-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 28, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1977 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Danny James & Shannon James, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-425-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1995 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Janne C. and Richard Gregoire 1:13-cv-03169) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1994 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Virginia Ann and Robert Leroy Snyder 1:13-cv-01456) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1993 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Teresa E, and Tony Mark Sellers 1:13-cv-02653) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1992 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Charles and Pamela Schwartz 1:15-cv-00040) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1991 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Norma and Ben Sanders 1:14-cv-00175) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1990 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Mary Louise and Bobby J. Proctor 1:12-cv-3815) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1989 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Cheryl K. and Carl Prange 1:15-cv-00633)) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1988 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Geraldine Mouyios 1:12-cv-02767) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1987 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Sharlene Morgan 1:12-cv-03075) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1986 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Angelia Moore 1:13-cv-03757) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1985 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Yefim Milter 1:12-cv-02130) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1984 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Frank and Jeanne Marin 1:13-cv-04126) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1983 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Bruce and Cathy MacGurn 1:14-cv-01842) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 25, 2017 Filing 1981 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Terry L. Linkemer 1:16-cv-2942) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 25, 2017 Filing 1980 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ronald V. and Francine Mecca-Jonas 1:12-cv-03079) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 25, 2017 Filing 1979 STIPULATION of Dismissal (James Jensen 1:14-cv-00848)) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 25, 2017 Filing 1978 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Venetia Jarrett 1:13-cv-00621) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 25, 2017 Filing 1977 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Danny James & Shannon James 1:12-cv-425) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 22, 2017 Filing 1982 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Deborah Mancill, Peter Mancill. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-7401262.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 21, 2017 Filing 1976 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Christine Catherine Brooks 1:13-cv-03863 by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 21, 2017 Filing 1975 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Tandy and Vickie Branham 1:15-cv-00777) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 21, 2017 Filing 1974 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Donald & Patricia Bowers 1:13-cv-01623) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 21, 2017 Filing 1973 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Pauline Blair 1:15-cv-00415) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 21, 2017 Filing 1972 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nancy Atherton 1:13-cv-00794) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 21, 2017 Filing 1971 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joseph & Colleen Amirr 1:12-cv-4353) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 21, 2017 Filing 1970 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Michael F. Abegg 16-cv-1578) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 21, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1969 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Michael F. Abegg, Civil Action Number 16-cv-1578-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 21, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1968 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Tandy and Vickie Branham, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00777-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 21, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1967 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Pauline Blair, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-00415-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 21, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1966 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice Sheldon Buch, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-330-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 21, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1965 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Christine Catherine Brooks, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03863-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 21, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1964 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Phyllis Coleman, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02388-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 21, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1963 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Donald & Patricia Bowers, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01623-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 21, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1962 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Nancy Atherton, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00794-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 21, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1961 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Joseph & Colleen Amirr, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-4353- WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 20, 2017 Filing 1969 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Michael F. Abegg 16-cv-1578) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
September 20, 2017 Filing 1968 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Tandy and Vickie Branham 1:15-cv-00777) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
September 20, 2017 Filing 1967 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Pauline Blair 1:15-cv-00415) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
September 20, 2017 Filing 1966 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Sheldon Buch 1:14-cv-330) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
September 20, 2017 Filing 1965 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Christine Catherine Brooks 1:13-cv-03863) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
September 20, 2017 Filing 1964 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Phyllis Coleman 1:13-cv-02388) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
September 20, 2017 Filing 1963 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Donald & Patricia Bowers 1:13-cv-01623) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii filed by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
September 20, 2017 Filing 1962 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nancy Atherton 1:13-cv-00794) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii filed by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
September 20, 2017 Filing 1961 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joseph & Colleen Amirr 1:12-cv-4353) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii filed by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (ddm)
September 20, 2017 Filing 1960 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Saunders on behalf of Jeffrey D. Pyper, Linda Pyper (Saunders, Joseph)
September 20, 2017 NOTICE OF HEARING (by docket entry only): An In Chambers Status Conference is set for 10/5/2017 at 9:00 AM before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. (bgt)
September 19, 2017 Filing 1959 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Marsha Moore. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-3637-WSD) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 15, 2017 Filing 1958 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Jeffrey D. Pyper, Linda Pyper. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-3563-WSD) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 13, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1957 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Sharon & David Summers, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-2592-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 13, 2017 Filing 1957 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Sharon & David Summers 1:13-cv-2592) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
September 13, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1956 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to D. Scott McIntosh, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00366-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
September 13, 2017 Filing 1956 STIPULATION of Dismissal (D. Scott McIntosh 1:13-cv-00366) pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.ii by D. Scott McIntosh. (ddm)
September 11, 2017 Filing 1955 SHORT FORM ANSWER to #1844 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand of SANDRA MARCH and ROBERT MARCH (17-cv-01763-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated.(Ash, Dana) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 11, 2017 Filing 1954 SHORT FORM ANSWER to #1843 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand of MICHAEL OSEGUERA by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated.(Ash, Dana) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 6, 2017 Filing 1953 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Mary Destouet. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-3401-WSD) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 6, 2017 Filing 1952 SHORT FORM ANSWER to #1860 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand of GEOFFREY B. SCHOFIELD and SHERRY SCHOFIELD (1:17-cv-02492-WSD) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated.(Ash, Dana) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 25, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1951 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Judith and Richard Sauget, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03569-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
August 25, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1950 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Tareq T. Samaneh, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-01477-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
August 25, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1948 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Robert Brock, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02857-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
August 25, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1949 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Carl & Jan Proehl, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-3069-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
August 25, 2017 Filing 1951 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Judith and Richard Sauget 1:13-cv-03569) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 25, 2017 Filing 1950 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Tareq T. Samaneh 1:14-cv-01477) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 25, 2017 Filing 1949 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Carl & Jan Proehl 1:12-cv-3069) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 25, 2017 Filing 1948 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Robert Brock 1:14-cv-02857) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 24, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1947 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Tamara Loosle, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-4301-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
August 24, 2017 Filing 1947 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Tamara Loosle 1:12-cv-4301) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting the law firm of Morris Bart LLC's (1912) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Mae Ellar Cowart. Attorney Mekel Smith Alvarez and Morris Bart, III are terminated from the docket. Plaintiff will continue to be represented by Salvadore Christina, Jr., Jennifer Crose, and Matthew Moreland of Becnel Law Firm, LLC. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 8/22/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02329-WSD, 1:12-cv-01305-WSD (bgt)
August 16, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1946 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Vincent F. Zounek and Susan Peil, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02366-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
August 16, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1945 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Janet Sanders, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-04499-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
August 16, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1944 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Heather A. Bianciotto, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02364-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
August 16, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1943 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Sharon McMahon Exec of Estate of Rosemary Maser, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-01610-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
August 16, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1942 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to June Feldman, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00360-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
August 16, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1941 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Dorothy Jean and Otto Herbert Barnhouse, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-01216-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs. (ddm)
August 15, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1940 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Karen Arnold and Gene Arnold, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03635-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 15, 2017 Filing 1946 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Vincent F. Zounek and Susan Peil 1:14-cv-02366) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 15, 2017 Filing 1945 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Janet Sanders 1:15-cv-04499) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 15, 2017 Filing 1944 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Heather A. Bianciotto 1:14-cv-02364) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 15, 2017 Filing 1943 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Sharon McMahon Exec of Estate of Rosemary Maser 1:15-cv-01610) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 15, 2017 Filing 1942 STIPULATION of Dismissal (June Feldman 1:14-cv-00360) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 15, 2017 Filing 1941 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dorothy Jean and Otto Herbert Barnhouse 1:15-cv-01216) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 15, 2017 Filing 1940 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Karen Arnold and Gene Arnold 1:12-cv-03635) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 14, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1939 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Ella Reed, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-1643-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Filing 1939 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Pamela Gallaway o/b/o the Estate of Ella Reid by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1936 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Kathy Wilson, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv 02800-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1935 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Sally and Barry Wilk, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03903-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1934 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Oscar Watson, Jr., Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01900-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1933 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Deborah Lee Tymer, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03073-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1931 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Stephen and Ann Spencer, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-0076-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1930 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Delbert and Robin Solsma, Civil Action Number 1:15-cv-01852-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1928 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Earl Skaggs, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-04374-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1927 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Edgar Satterthwait, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-01715-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1925 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Sally Quisling, Civil Action Number 15-cv-02646-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1922 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Gabriella and David Mulcahy, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-1550-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1921 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Naysa and William Mowell, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02393-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1937 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Gerald and Carolyn Zackin, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-04314-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1929 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Kaylene Brock Smith and Jerry Smith, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-02992-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1926 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Patricia Rook, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-1555-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1932 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Leon Thomas, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-01240-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 11, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1924 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Janet Pommrehn, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-00692-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 10, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1920 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Evelyn and Kenneth Miller, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03588-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 10, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1919 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Pieternella & Hendrick Meuzelaar, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-3668-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 10, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1923 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to David and Christine Piper, Civil Action Number 1:11-cv-4409-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 10, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1917 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Judith Marketos, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-01510-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 10, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1913 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Nancy Hoover and Duke Spitzer, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03684-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 9, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1915 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Naomi and Roger Kingery, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02743-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 9, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1916 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Robert and Dolores Lentine, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-2577-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 9, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1914 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Gail Jansen, Civil Case Number 1:12-cv-02564-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1937 STIPULATION of Dismissal Gerald and Carolyn Zackin 1:12-cv-04314) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1936 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Kathy Wilson 1:15-cv 02800) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1935 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Sally and Barry Wilk 1:13-cv-03903) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1934 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Oscar Watson, Jr. 1:13-cv-01900) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1933 STIPULATION of Dismissal Deborah Lee Tymer 1:13-cv-03073) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1932 STIPULATION of Dismissal Leon Thomas 1:12-cv-01240) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1931 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stephen and Ann Spencer 1:14-cv-0076) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1930 STIPULATION of Dismissal Delbert and Robin Solsma 1:15-cv-01852) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1929 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Kaylene Brock Smith and Jerry Smith 1:12-cv-02992) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1928 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Earl Skaggs 1:12-cv-04374) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1927 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Edgar Satterthwait 1:13-cv-01715) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1926 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Patricia Rook 1:12-cv-1555) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1925 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Sally Quisling 15-cv-02646) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1924 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Janet Pommrehn 1:12-cv-00692) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1923 STIPULATION of Dismissal (David and Christine Piper 1:11-cv-04409) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1922 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Gabriella and David Mulcahy 1:13-cv-1550) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1921 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Naysa and William Mowell 1:13-cv-02393) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1920 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Evelyn and Kenneth Miller 1:13-cv-03588) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1919 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Pieternella & Hendrick Meuzelaar) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1918 FILED IN ERROR --STIPULATION of Dismissal (Duncan Scott McIntosh (6:12-cv-2085) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana) Modified on 8/11/2017 (ddm).
August 9, 2017 Filing 1917 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Judith Marketos 1:14-cv-01510) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1916 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Robert and Dolores Lentine 1:13-cv-2577) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1915 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Naomi and Roger Kingery (1:13-cv-02743) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1914 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Gail Jansen 1:12-cv-02564) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1913 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Nancy Hoover and Duke Spitzer 1:13-cv-03684) by Wright Medical Group Incorporated, Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Ash, Dana)
August 8, 2017 Filing 1938 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Allison Benson. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-2994-WSD) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Disclosure, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 8, 2017 Filing 1912 MOTION to Withdraw the law firm of Morris Bart LLC as counsel for Plaintiff Mae Ellar Cowart. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ddm)
August 4, 2017 Filing 1911 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to attorney David L. Hood re #1866 Order returned via USPS marked "Return to Sender". (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Filing 1910 RESPONSE re #1881 Response (Non-Motion), #1861 Response (Non-Motion),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1856 Order, Set Submission Deadline,, filed by Michael Abegg, Dennis Abts, Cathy Adams, Gerald Adams, Michael Shane Adams, Gaetano Aiello, Marjorie Aiello, David Albright, Elaine Albright, Deborah Aldrich, James Aldrich, Barbara A. Alexander, Johnnie Alexander, Willie Alexander, Catherine Allen, Danny Ray Allen, Michael XX Allen, Michael Allen, Michael Allen, Willa J. Allen, Samuel Ambler, Jacqueline Ames, Colleen Amirr, Joseph Amirr, Douglas F. Anderson, Janet B. Anderson, Ray Anderson, Sharon Anderson, Douglas Armstrong, Tammi Armstrong, Gene Arnold, Harvey Arnold, Joan Arnold, Karen Arnold, Larry Arnold, Judith Arvoy, Nancy Atherton, Lawrence Bachelder, Sherri Bacovsky, Steven J. Bacovsky, Ruth M. Bader, Shalonda Bailey, Jimmie Lee Baker, Laurel Baker, Mary Baker, Wayne Baker, Corey S. Barnard, Dorothy Jean Barnhouse, Otto Herbert Barnhouse, Carmela Barone, Giovanni Barone, Gail Bartels, John Bartels, David Barton, Teresa Barwick, Karyn Bentlin, Richard Bentlin, Heather A. Bianciotto, Gina Bianckino, Steven Birkson, Elizabeth Birmingham, Thomas E. Birmingham, Angelika Black, Norman Black, Pauline Blair, Karen Block, Hilda Blount, Bonnie Sue Bogert, Richard E. Bogert, David L. Bonham, Donald Bonkosky, John Borg, Terry Borg, Richard Robert Bourdeaux, Stephanie Bourdeaux, Donald Bowers, Patricia Bowers, Fred Braasch, Michaela Braasch, Randy Scott Bradshaw, Ray Bradshaw, Jr, Vickie Branham, Tandy Branham III, Cecil Brannan, Constance Brannan, Linda Bratcher, Larry A. Breeze, Valerie Brennan, Phyllis Brenneman, Hope Briggs, Robert L. Brock, Christine Catherine Brooks, Nicole Brooks, Doris Jean Brown, Joseph Brown, Letha Brown, Steven Brown, Sr, Arthur Bruce, Dorothy Bruce, Theresa Brunori, Stephen F. Brynelson, Janell Foster Bryson, Sheldon Buch, Charles W. Buettenmuller, Mary Burgart, Roger Burgart, John E. Burger, Cecil Burnett, David Burns, Saundra Burns, Jeffery Butler, Jeffrey E. Butler, Margreth C. Butterworth, James Button, Tessa Cain, William Cain, James Calvert, Sadie Calvert, Denise Calzada, John Campbell, Doug Cannady, Gayle Cannady, Nicholas Carl, Denise Carnegie, Sammy Carnegie, Edith Carnes, Frances Carter, Wanda Carter, Gerald G. Case, Gerald Case, Joann Case, Susan Case, Edward J. Cherveny, Annette Childs, Robert Lee Chisolm, Dennis Christensen, Florence Christensen, Gene Christiansen, Robyn Christiansen, John Christy, William Chrostowski, Tina Marie Cien, Joe A. Cienfuegos, Jr, Twyla Clarke, France Clausen, Mark A. Clausen, Cathleen Claussenius, Barry A. Cochran, Brenda Cochran, David Cochran, Diana C. Cochran, Eleda Cohen, Phyllis Coleman, Otis Collier, Mary Constantino, Leslee Cook, William Earl Cook, Jr, Joe Council, Mae Ellar Cowart, Billy Eugene Cox, Celia E. Cox, Patricia L. Croak, Richard B. Croak, Helen Crocker-Pope, Steven Cross, Carlodina J. Cruz, Eliel Cruz, Ernest Cummings, Kathryn Cummings, Nancy Cunningham, Samantha Curran, Dave Currens, Kay Currens, Margaret Curtis, GERALD DAUGHERTY, MARIANNE DAUGHERTY, Joey Daigle, Brian K. Dameron, Jo Dawn Danley, Richard Danley, Joann Daskivich, Michael Daskivich, Diona Davis, Ginger Davis, James E. Davis, Denise Davis-Reno, Brian M. Day, Patricia M. Day, Cresencio DeJesus, Patricia DeJesus, Milton DeLair, Patricia DeLair, John R. DeWolf, Paula DeWolf, Cheri Dees, Jace Dees, Francine Degenhardt, Thomas Degenhardt, Jerry Dennard, Jr, Diane Deville, Roman Deville, Anne L. Dickerson, Lisa Diercksen, Ronald Diercksen, Ray Z. Dissinger, David Dockerty, Larry R. Dodd, Cheryl K. Doebrick, Robert J. Doebrick, Larry C. Dogs, Noreen M. Dogs, Nancy Dolensek, Kathleen Dougherty, Lawrence Dougherty, Jr, Katherine Douglas, Robert Douglas, Leilani Dow, Dennis M. Doyle, Kathleen A. Doyle, Janet E. Duecy, Jane Duke, Myron Dunn, Nancy Dunn, Rosemary Duvall, William Duvall, Doris Edelman, Sheldon Edelman, Ray Eigenbrode, Benjamin Eisenberg, Marilyn Eisenberg, Larita Elias, Mervin Elias, Kathy L. Eliason, Arthur E. Elliott, Leah Elshaug, Shane Elshaug, Lisa Elston, Michael Feinberg, Douglas Feld, Nancie Feld, June Feldman, Fred W. Fewell, Martha J. Fewell, James Fields, Linda Fields, Alberto Fierro, Ann Fillmore, Ben Fillmore, Amy Fine, Steven Fine, Pauline Finstad, Robert Finstad, Linda M. Fishel, Stephen M. Fishel, Shirley Fisher, Linda K. Floyd, Shirley Foliart, Shirley Foliart, Margie J. Fredrickson, Craig J. Freebersyser, Janice M. Freebersyser, Jerry French, Nicole M. Frey, Donald Friend, Gina Friend, George Fry, Jr, Rosemary Fry, Thomas Gadbois, Authelia Gallman, Bertha Gamble, Gary Gamble, Cynthia Gandy, Patrick Gandy, Shelley Garbes, James Henry Garcia, Diane Gebhart, Robert A. Gebhart, II, Robert Giacometti, Sally Giacometti, Deborah L. Giasson, Guy P. Giasson, Michael Glassco, Nancy A. Gleim, William R. Gleim, Hiram Glenn, Jr, Donald Gobel, John Goromboly, Glen Graves, Harold L. Graves, Sandra R. Graves, Roger Gray, Kevin L. Greenfield, Wanda Greenfield, Janne C. Gregoire, Richard Gregoire, Margaret Groff, Phillip Groff, Henry Gross, Mary Grossbier, Gerald Gubanski, Fabian Guillen, Janet M. Gunter, Betty L. Hall, Dianne A. Hall, Janice L. Hall, Peter A. Hall, Raymond E. Hall, James Carter Hamilton, Kelley Renee Hamilton, Gregory Rothmere Hamlin, Mark Hammond, Cherie M. Hanks, Wilda J. Harbison, Dorothy J. Hardy, Richard C. Hardy, Frances Harmon, Happy Harrington, James Harris, June Harrison, Reginald Harrison, Paula Hartwell, Thomas Harward, Valerie Harward, Valerie Hasely, Jean B. Hastings, Robert L. Hastings, William Haverly, Larry Hawkins, Earl J. Hebert, Linda Hebert, Mary Heldenbrand, Harold Henderson, Jr, Judith A. Hendrix, Linda R. Hepner, David Herold, Kathleen Herold, Eric Herzog, Judith Ann Hildebrand, Ricky Hill, Royal Lee Hines, Patricia Hinrichs, Timothy Hinrichs, Darrell Hirsch, Julie Hobert, Irwin Hoffman, Jacqueline A. Hoffman, Theresa J. Hohenberger, Gloria Hollenbeck, James V. Holmes, Percy Holmes, Terry Homer, Henry R. Hooker, Naomi E. Hooker, Nancy Hoover, Bobby Gene Horine, Patricia Diane Horine, Jimmy Horton, Helen R. Hribar, Lyle Huisinga, Tracey Huisinga, Charles Edward Hundt, Carol Hutchinson, Charles Hutchinson, Linda Hyde, James Igoe, David Ishmael, Lisa Ishmael, Donna Jackson, Harry Jacobs, Danny L. James, Sr, Gail Jansen, Coleman Jarrett, Paula Jarrett, Venetia Jarrett, Patricia Jeffers, Marlene A. Jennings, Ross Jennings, James Jensen, Pamela Jerzak, Anthony Johnson, Celeste Johnson, Emma Jean Johnson, Eric C. Johnson, James Johnson, Karen J. Johnson, Kathleen Minadeo Johnson, Kathy Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Nancy C. Johnson, Norma Johnson, Sharon M. Johnson, Winnie Johnson, Jerry L. Johnson, Sr, Francine Mecca Jonas, Ronald Jonas, Donald Jones, Evelyn Jones, Frederick W. Jones, John C. Jurgerson, Denise Kabisch, Marilyn Katz, Carole Kearn, Nikki Kellogg, William Kellogg, Mauryce Kennon, Ronald Kimsey, Harry D Kinard, Sharon Ginger Kinard, Naomi Kingery, Roger Kingery, Taleeea Isaphine Kinsey, Lisa M. Kirk, David Kirkley, Dianna Kirkley, Larry Koenig, Tamara Koenig, Debra Korszeniewski, Nancy L. Koul, Melvin Kruse, Joseph A. LaRue, Joseph Abel LaRue, Jr, Joseph Abel LaRue, Jr, Cheryl Lachance, Donna M. Lalk, Jeannie Lansdell, Perry Lansdell, Anthony Laron, Diane Lattimore, David Lavares, Sheryl Lawman, Michael Lee, David R. Leitner, Joan M. Leitner, Dolores Lentine, Robert Lentine, Franklin Lester, Lanny Long, Ruth Ann Long, Tamara Loosle, Edna Lopez, Joe F. Lopez, Roy Gene Lyles, Kathy Lyons, Richard Lyons, Bruce MacGurn, Cathy MacGurn, Andrew Maizner, Alan Maltin, Connie Maltin, Barry Mang, Kim Elizabeth Manning, Sandra March, Robert Marchlewicz, Frank Marin, Paul Marino, Paul J. Marino, Judith Marketos, Beverly Marshall, Billy Marshall, Olga L. Martin, Terry D. Martin, Kristine M. Mason, Larry Mason, George Mattison, Linda Mattison, Mary McClarity, Katherine M. McClellan, Vera McClelland, Brian McCormick, Dorothea McCormick, S. Michael McCormick, Jammie McCovery, Shirley Ann McCright, Lester E. McDowell, Kathy McGee, Anita McGrady, Michael McGrady, D. Scott McIntosh, Joshua McIntosh, Marguerita C. McIntosh, Marvin R. McIntosh, Sharon McMahon, Sharon McMahon, James McQuerry, Martin Mead, Russell Meier, Mary Ann Meiling, Phillip Meiling, Dale Susan Meltzer, William Allan Menne, Martin Metzger, Hendrick Meuzelaar, Pieternella Meuzelaar, Carol Sue Meyer, Melvin Ray Meyer, Cheri A. Meyerhofer, Nicholas Meyerhofer, Terry Meza, Joanne L. Michaels, Karen Michaels, Evelyn Miller, James Miller, Jane Miller, Kenneth Miller, Linda Miller, Merle Miller, Phyllis Susan Miller, Victor Miller, Robert Milliron, Norman Mills, Yefim Milter, Elie M. Mims, Norma C. Mims, John Ming, Sharon Ming, Christine Minton, Michael Minton, Marilyn R. Monson, Lequata Montgomery, William Montgomery, Richard Montreuil, Angelia Moore, Betty Moore, Phillip Ray Moore, Alan M. Morales, Helen Morales, Kathy Morales, Horace Dewayne Morgan, Sharlene Morgan, Megan Mork, Beverly Morrison, Kristin A. Morrow, Theresa Morton, Geraldine Mouyios, Naysa Mowell, William Mowell, David L. Mulcahy, Gabriella Mulcahy, Jennifer Murin, Andlle Naeter, Rita Nail, Anthony Neal, Mathew Neelley, Vivian Neelley, Elizabeth S. Neily, Shawna Nelson, Deborah Newton, Stephen Nichols, Mark Ronald Nord, Henry Earl O'Cain, Dan Offrell, Edward Oksienik, Rod Olsen, Muriel Olson, Shirley Orsinelli, Joseph C. Ortega, Rita L. Ortega, Michael Oseguera, John Otey, James Dirk Owens, Lisa Owens, Evelyn Pacheco, Richard Paes, Charles Palmer, Marilyn M. Palmer, Mark Palmer, Don Palow, Sharron Palow, Larry Parrish, Bobbie Patterson, Eileen Paul, Jeffrey Paul, John Payne, Susan Peil, Darius Perez, Frances C. Perkins, Jan Perry, Robert Perry, Darren Peterson, Pamela Peterson, Alexander Petrovic, Vivian Petrovic, Lavern Pfeiffer, Herman Phillips, Wanda Phillips, Christine Piper, David F. Piper, Tolling Agreement Plaintiffs, Charles Plungis, Diane Plungis, Christa Poindexter, Angela Pokorny, Oscar C. Pokorny, Timothy J. Poling, Janet Pommrehn, Joanne P. Porter, Scott Jeffrey Porter, Christine Powell, Marcola Powell, Carl Prange, Cheryl K. Prange, Galina Preobrazhenskaya, Gene Allan Presler, Jeannie E. Presler, Kenneth
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1909 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Samantha Curran, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-00784-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1907 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Jean B. and Robert L. Hastings, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-0339-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1908 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Linda R. Helpner, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03782-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1906 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Valerie P. and Thomas Harward, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-02176-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1905 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Raymond E. and Janice L. Hall, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-01944-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1904 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Betty L. Hall, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00165-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1903 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Gerald Gubanski, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-02436-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1902 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Robert and Sally Giacometti, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-2249-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1901 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Amy and Steven Fine, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-00798-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1900 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Kathy L. Eliason, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00443-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1899 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice, as to Marilyn Eisenberg, Civil Action Number 1:12-cv-03077-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1898 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Francine and Thomas Degenhardt, Civil Action Number 1:14-cv-00269-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1897 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Ernest and Kathryn Cummings, Civil Action Number 1:13-cv-03762-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1896 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Mark A. and France Clausen, Civil Action Number 1:12-CV-3840-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1895 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Edith Carnes, Civil Action Number 1:13-CV-1534-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1894 Stipulation of Dismissal as to John Campbell, Civil Action Number 1:13-CV-02693-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #1893 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Denise Calzada, Civil Action Number 1:12-CV-1554-WSD, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs. (ddm)
August 4, 2017