68th Street Site Work Group v. Airgas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: 68th Street Site Work Group
Defendant: Graybar Electric Company Inc., Lear Corporation, Norris Automotive Holdings LLC, Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership, Ridgeway Manor, Inc., Solo Cup Company, Mondelez International, Inc., Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc., Schmidt Baking Company, Inc., Batesville Casket Company, Inc., Asarco LLC, Ally Financial Inc., Brink's Inc., Universal Music Group, Inc., Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company, Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Co. L.P., National Institutes of Health, Visual Marking Systems, Inc., Tektronix, Inc., NCR Corporation, American Sugar Refining, Inc., Unilever United States, Inc., Treehouse Private Brands, Inc., Avis Rent A Car System, LLC, New Ridge Associates, Inc., MacDermid, Inc., Smyth Jewelers Inc., Melibelle USA, Inc., Ascension St. Agnes Hospital, Penske Logistics LLC, PQ Corporation, Lifestar Response Corporation, Froehling & Robertson, Inc., Quikrete Holdings, Inc., Jerry's Chevrolet, Inc., Hohmann & Barnard, Inc., Kmart Corporation, Harland Clarke Corp., Foot Locker Specialty, Inc., Glen-Gery Corporation, Heritage Chevrolet-Buick, Inc., H&R Block, Inc., Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC, CRW Parts Inc., Aaron's, Inc., Abacus Corporation, Roper Corporation, Donohoe Real Estate Services, Laird Plastics, Inc., Alban Tractor Co., Inc., Carisam-Samuel Meisel (MD), Inc., Nationwide Auto Sales Corp., CitiFinancial Credit Company, Givaudan Flavors Corporation, Albert S. Smyth Co., Inc., High's of Baltimore, LLC, Eby-Brown Company, LLC, F.N.B. Corporation, Powercon Corporation, Coach USA, Inc., Prince Minerals, LLC, Stella Maris Operating Corp., USF Redstar LLC, Fuchs Lubricants Co., Amtote International, Inc., Dayton Superior Corporation, Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., PVH Corp., Enterprise Electric Company, Clark Equipment Company, Tri-Star Realty, LLP, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Graul's Market, Inc., Viad Corp., Poly-Seal LLC, Bob Bell Automotive Group, Inc., Illinois Sleep Products, Inc., The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Crown Central LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Industrial Container Services, LLC, ViacomCBS, Inc., Lifoam Industries, LLC, Cowan Systems, Inc., Legg Mason, Inc., Jotun Paints, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company, Airgas, Inc., Vornado Realty Trust, The Maryland Management Company, McCormick & Company, Inc., Benjamin Moore & Co., First National Bank of Pennsylvania, Bob Davidson Ford, Inc., Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., The Rukert Terminals Corporation, Holly Poultry, Inc., Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc., Bunge North America (East), L.L.C., Russell T. Bundy Associates, Inc., Schumacher & Seiler, Inc., Lebanon Seaboard Corporation, YRC Worldwide Inc., Caplan Brothers, Inc., Lion Brothers Company, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Bell and Howell, LLC, Burt Rigid Box, Inc., Detroit Royalty, Inc., Berwind Corporation, Roca USA Inc., Ceres Marine Terminals Inc., Master-Halco, Inc., American Express Company, Valley Motors, Inc., Armacell, LLC, . Service America Corporation, Koros, LLC, Chiquita Brands LLC, The Victory Racing Plate Company, NL Industries, Inc., King David at Autumn Lake LLC, Drug City Pharmacy, LLC, Pactiv LLC, Shell Oil Company, Truist Financial Corporation, Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc., Brand Industrial Services, Inc., Premier Technology Inc., Lifetouch National School Studios, LLC, A&M (2015) LLC, C&I Leasing, Inc., HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc., Len Stoler, Inc., US Foods, Inc., Eclipse International, Inc., M. Weinman Company, Inc., Elg Metals, Inc., Keurig Dr. Pepper, Inc., State Farm Life Insurance Company, Hampshire Industries, Inc., Caraustar Industries, Inc., Unisys Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., American Premier Underwriters, Inc., Greif, Inc., 7-Eleven, Inc., Pabst Brewing Co., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Genesco Inc., Lane Bryant, Inc., Mawson and Mawson, Inc., Eagle Group and Solo Cup Operating Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv03385
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9613 Comp Environ Recovery Comp & Liability Act (CERCLA) - Civil Proceedings
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 918 ORDER of USCA "granting" motion to withdraw counsel as to #910 Notice of Appeal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 917 USCA Case Number 23-1155 for #910 Notice of Appeal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Case Manager - Taylor Barton (jb5s, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 916 QC NOTICE re: Defendant Vornado Trust's #914 Notice of Change of Address in its Line Striking Appearance. **Counsel is responsible for updating address and other information as necessary in CM/ECF. You may do so by logging in using the credentials of the attorney(s) that need(s) updating, click "Utilities" from the main menu bar, go to the category of "Your CM/ECF Account" and click "maintain your account". Thank you. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 915 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #914 Line Striking Appearance of Monica P. Schroeck as counsel for Vornado Realty Trust. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/10/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 914 NOTICE by 68th Street Site Work Group LINE STRIKING APPEARANCE (McKillop, Daniel)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 913 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #910 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(jb5s, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 912 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #911 Line striking appearance of Jonathan A. Singer as counsel for Defendant Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/9/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 911 NOTICE by Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC re Striking Appearance of Counsel (Blumenfeld, Michael)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 910 NOTICE OF APPEAL by 68th Street Site Work Group. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMDDC-10421474.(Justis, Gary)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 909 Correspondence re: Judgment in a Civil Action, filed by C&I Leasing, Inc. (Fitzgerald, Stephen)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 908 NOTICE by Solo Cup Operating Corporation, ViacomCBS, Inc., Vornado Realty Trust re #877 Response in Opposition to Motion, 876 Order,, Proposed Judgment in a Civil Action (Fedder, Steven)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 907 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #906 Consent Motion to Dismiss Defendant Citifinancial Credit Company with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/10/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 906 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Citifinancial Credit Company with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Justis, Gary)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 905 PAPERLESS ORDER Granting #902 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Travers Merryman terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/27/2022. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 904 PAPERLESS ORDER Granting #903 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rachel D. Guthrie terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/27/2022. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 903 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Rachel D. Guthrie by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guthrie, Rachel)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 902 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew T. Merryman by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merryman, Matthew)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 901 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D. Justis on behalf of 68th Street Site Work Group (Justis, Gary)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 900 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #899 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gary D. Justis. Directing attorney Gary D. Justis to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 899 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gary D. Justis (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10316432.) by 68th Street Site Work Group(Kaplow, Stuart)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 898 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #897 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Virginia Wood Barnhart terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/28/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 897 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CitiFinancial Credit Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnhart, Virginia)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 896 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff 68th Street Site Work Group and by CitiFinancial Credit Company (Barnhart, Virginia)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 895 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #894 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/18/2022. (vals, Chambers)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 894 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Default Judgment by CitiFinancial Credit Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnhart, Virginia)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 893 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #892 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew James Youssef terminated as counsel of record for Defendant Schumacher & Seiler, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/31/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 892 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Schumacher & Seiler, Inc.(Youssef, Matthew)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 891 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #890 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/27/2022. (vals, Chambers)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 890 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #881 MOTION for Default Judgment as to CitiFinancial Credit Company by CitiFinancial Credit Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnhart, Virginia)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 889 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #888 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/12/2022. (vals, Chambers)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 888 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #881 MOTION for Default Judgment as to CitiFinancial Credit Company With Consent by CitiFinancial Credit Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meyer, Sarah)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 887 ORDER OF JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Solo Cup Operating Corporation, ViacomCBS, Inc., Vornado Realty Trust against Plaintiff 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/10/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 886 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/10/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 885 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #883 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #881 MOTION for Default Judgment as to CitiFinancial Credit Company. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/9/2022. (vals, Chambers)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 884 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Wood Barnhart on behalf of CitiFinancial Credit Company (Barnhart, Virginia)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 883 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #881 MOTION for Default Judgment as to CitiFinancial Credit Company by CitiFinancial Credit Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meyer, Sarah)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 882 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Meyer on behalf of CitiFinancial Credit Company (Meyer, Sarah)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 881 MOTION for Default Judgment as to CitiFinancial Credit Company by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RD/RA Consent Decree, #2 Exhibit B - Appendix C to RD/RA Consent Decree, #3 Exhibit C - CitiFinancial Nexus Documents, #4 Exhibit D - August 28, 2020 Offer Letter and Delivery Confirmation, #5 Exhibit E - December 11, 2020 Offer Letter and Deliver Confirmation, #6 Exhibit F - 68th Street Site RD/RA Costs Chart, #7 Exhibit G - Maps for 300 St. Paul, #8 Exhibit H - MDAT Records for CitiFinancial f/k/a Commercial Credit Company, #9 Exhibit I - Stenographer Ad, The Baltimore Sun (Sept 23, 1957), #10 Exhibit J - MDAT Records for C C Supply Corporation, #11 Exhibit K - 1970 Accounts Receivable Ledger, #12 Exhibit L - Ratio of Cashout Settlements to Nexus Document Totals for Settling Non-Performing Cashout RD/RA Consent Decree Parties Chart, #13 Exhibit M - CitiFinancial Interest Calculation)(Merryman, Matthew)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 880 REPLY to Response to Motion re #875 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Solo Cup Company, Solo Cup Operating Corporation.(Fedder, Steven)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 879 REPLY to Response to Motion re #874 Joint MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by ViacomCBS, Inc..(Johnston, Mark)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 878 RESPONSE in Opposition re #875 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Solo Cup filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDAT Records for Maryland Cup Corporation, #2 Exhibit B - MDAT Records for Sweetheart Cup Corporation, #3 Exhibit C - Article from The Baltimore Sun (Oct. 12, 1969), #4 Exhibit D - MDAT Records for Sweetheart Holding Corp. f/k/a Maryland Cup Corporation, #5 Exhibit E - MDAT Records for Solo Cup Operating Corporation, #6 Exhibit F - MDAT Records for Solo Cup I, #7 Exhibit G - ILSOS Records for SCC Holding Company, #8 Exhibit H - ILSOS Records for Solo Cup I, #9 Exhibit I - MDAT Records for Solo Cup II, #10 Exhibit J - MDAT Records for Solo Cup III, #11 Exhibit K - ILSOS Records for Solo Cup III, #12 Exhibit L - ILSOS Records for Solo Cup Operating Corporation)(Guthrie, Rachel)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 877 RESPONSE in Opposition re #874 Joint MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Guthrie, Rachel)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 876 PAPERLESS ORDER: This Court has received the Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings, ECF 874, 875. This Court notes that a Clerks Entry of Default was entered on May 14, 2021, ECF 649, against CitiFinancial Credit Company. If Plaintiffs intend to file a motion for a default judgment against CitiFinancial, they are directed to do so by April 15, 2022. Otherwise, on or before April 15, 2022, Plaintiffs are directed to file a notice dismissing the complaint against CitiFinancial or otherwise advising the Court how they wish to proceed with respect to CitiFinancial.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/25/2022. (vals, Chambers)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 875 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Solo Cup Company, Solo Cup Operating Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedder, Steven)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 874 Joint MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Solo Cup Operating Corporation, ViacomCBS, Inc., Vornado Realty Trust (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Glajch, Jessica)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 873 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #872 Status Report and the request for modification of the Scheduling Order deadlines as set forth therein. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/14/2022. (vals, Chambers)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 872 NOTICE by Vornado Realty Trust JOINT REQUEST BY ALL PARTIES FOR MODIFICATION OF THE SCHEDULING ORDER (Baker, William)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 871 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 7/13/2022. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/28/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 870 PAPERLESS ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #866 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; directing Plaintiffs initial complaint remains pending against several Defendants that filed answers to that complaint. Thus, allowing an interlocutory appeal of this Courts decision to deny Plaintiffs Second Corrected Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint would create an extraordinary risk of piecemeal and duplicative appeals. If Plaintiffs are correct in their prediction that the answering Defendants will prevail on forthcoming dispositive motions, then Plaintiffs will be able to appeal once they do. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/28/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 869 RESPONSE in Opposition re #866 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability of this Court's January 26, 2022 Order filed by Alban Tractor Co., Inc..(Waterworth, Gregory)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 868 RESPONSE in Opposition re #866 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability of this Court's January 26, 2022 Order Joint Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Certify filed by C&I Leasing, Inc., Solo Cup Operating Corporation, The Rukert Terminals Corporation, ViacomCBS, Inc., Vornado Realty Trust.(Fitzgerald, Stephen)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 867 NOTICE by 68th Street Site Work Group re #865 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Notice of Plaintiff's Intentions to Proceed Against Remaining Defendants Named in the Original Complaint (Merryman, Matthew)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 866 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability of this Court's January 26, 2022 Order by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guthrie, Rachel)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 865 ORDER denying #828 Plaintiffs' Second Corrected Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; and directing Plaintiffs to advise this Court how they wish to proceed with respect to the four Defendants against whom the original Complaint remains pending. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/26/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 864 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/26/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 863 QC NOTICE re: #862 Notice of Change of Law Firm and email addresses filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. **Counsel is responsible for updating its own information in CM/ECF. They may do so by each attorney logging into CM/ECF using their own individual credentials. Once logged in, click "Utilities", then click "Your CM/ECF Account", and lastly click "Maintain Your Account". Each attorney should update any fields listed accordingly. Thank you. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 862 NOTICE by 68th Street Site Work Group of Change of Law Firm and Email Addresses for Attorneys Rachel D. Guthrie and Matthew T. Merryman (Guthrie, Rachel)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 861 REPLY to Response to Motion re #828 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Second Corrected Motion) Plaintiffs' Reply to Solo Cup Operating Corp.'s Response in Opposition (Dkt. No. 853) filed by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Guthrie, Rachel)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 860 REPLY to Response to Motion re #828 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Second Corrected Motion) Plaintiffs' Reply to C&I Leasing, Inc.'s Response in Opposition (Dkt. No. 851) filed by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Guthrie, Rachel)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 859 REPLY to Response to Motion re #828 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Second Corrected Motion) Plaintiffs' Reply to ViacomCBS, Inc.'s Response in Opposition (Dkt. No. 852) filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 68th Street Site Work Group Executed Assignments)(Guthrie, Rachel)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 858 REPLY to Response to Motion re #828 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Second Corrected Motion) Plaintiff's Reply to Joint Response in Opposition (Dkt. No. 850) filed by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Guthrie, Rachel)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 857 ORDER GRANTING #856 Motion to Dismiss American Sugar Refining, Inc. w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/7/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 856 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss American Sugar Refining, Inc. with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 855 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #854 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/20/2021. (vals, Chambers)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 854 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #850 Response in Opposition to Motion, #851 Response in Opposition to Motion, #853 Response in Opposition to Motion, #852 Response in Opposition to Motion by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guthrie, Rachel)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 853 RESPONSE in Opposition re #828 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Second Corrected Motion) Memorandum of Law Regarding Successor Liability in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Solo Cup Operating Corporation.(Fedder, Steven)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 852 RESPONSE in Opposition re #828 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Second Corrected Motion) filed by ViacomCBS, Inc..(Glajch, Jessica)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 851 RESPONSE in Opposition re #828 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Second Corrected Motion) Defendant C&J Leasing, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law Regarding Successor Liability in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by C&I Leasing, Inc..(Fitzgerald, Stephen)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 850 RESPONSE in Opposition re #828 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Second Corrected Motion) Joint Memorandum of Law Regarding Arranger Liability in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Alban Tractor Co., Inc., C&I Leasing, Inc., Solo Cup Operating Corporation, The Rukert Terminals Corporation, ViacomCBS, Inc., Vornado Realty Trust.(Fitzgerald, Stephen)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 849 ORDER granting #848 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc. with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/15/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 848 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Dismiss HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc. with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 847 NOTICE by The Rukert Terminals Corporation of Withdrawal of Appearance of Lauren E. Lake (Lake, Lauren)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 846 ORDER granting #845 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc. with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/8/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 845 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc. with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 844 NOTICE of Change of Address by Margaret M Witherup (Witherup, Margaret)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 843 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #839 , #840 , #841 , and #842 Motions to Dismiss; dismissing with prejudice Defendants Crown Central LLC, New Ridge Associates, Inc., Stella Maris Operating Corp., and High's of Baltimore, LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/29/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 842 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss High's of Baltimore, LLC with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 841 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Stella Maris Operating Corp. with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 840 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss New Ridge Associates, Inc. with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 839 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Crown Central LLC with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER granting as unopposed #819 and #820 Motions to Dismiss; dismissing without prejudice Defendants Premier Technology Inc. and Russell T. Bundy Associates, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/23/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 837 ORDER granting #836 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Roper Corporation with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/22/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 836 MOTION to Dismiss Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Roper Corporation with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 835 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's #810 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice Defendant NL Industries, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/18/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 834 REPLY to Response to Motion re #810 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss NL Industries, Inc. without Prejudice filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nexus Documents for NL Industries)(Guthrie, Rachel)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 833 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #832 Stipulation, filed by C&I Leasing, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/16/2021. (vals, Chambers)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 832 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to File Between Plaintiff 68th Street Site Work Group & Defendants C&J Leasing, Inc., Alban Tractor LLC, the Rukert Terminals Corporation, Solo Cup Company, ViacomCBS, Inc., and Vornado Realty Trust by C&I Leasing, Inc.(Fitzgerald, Stephen)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER granting #829 Motion to Dismiss; granting #830 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing Defendants Donohoe Real Estate Services and Bob Bell Automotive Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/16/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 830 MOTION to Dismiss Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Bob Bell Automotive Group, Inc. with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 829 MOTION to Dismiss Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Donohoe Real Estate Services with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 828 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Second Corrected Motion) by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint Comparison with Original Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Merryman, Matthew)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 827 ORDER granting #824 Corrected Motion to Dismiss re Defendant Long and Foster Real Estate, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/15/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 826 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Lake on behalf of The Rukert Terminals Corporation (Lake, Lauren)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 825 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M Witherup on behalf of The Rukert Terminals Corporation (Witherup, Margaret)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 824 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc. without Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 823 RESPONSE in Opposition re #810 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss NL Industries, Inc. without Prejudice filed by NL Industries, Inc..(Waterworth, Gregory)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 822 ORDER granting #817 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Chiquita Brands LLC without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/8/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 821 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #816 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Monica P Schroeck. Directing attorney Monica P Schroeck to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/8/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 820 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Russell T. Bundy Associates, Inc. without Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 819 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Premier Technology Inc. without Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 818 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc. without Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 817 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Chiquita Brands LLC without Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 816 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Monica P. Schroeck (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9591801.) by Vornado Realty Trust(Baker, William)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 815 ORDER granting #813 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/3/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 814 ORDER granting #811 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Jerrys Chevrolet, Inc. without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/3/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 813 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 812 ORDER granting #809 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Lebanon Seaboard Corporation without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/3/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 811 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Jerrys Chevrolet, Inc. without Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 810 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss NL Industries, Inc. without Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 809 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Lebanon Seaboard Corporation without Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER granting #807 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/3/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 807 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. without Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 806 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint Comparison with Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Merryman, Matthew)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 805 Correspondence re: Defendants Not Named in Amended Complaint (Guthrie, Rachel)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER directing plaintiffs to advise in writing by the closed of business on November 2, 2021 their intent with respect to their claims against defendants. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/2/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 803 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Merryman, Matthew)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 802 ORDER granting #798 Motion to Dismiss; granting #800 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing Defendants Grief, Inc. and Pabst Brewing Co. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/1/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 801 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #799 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/1/2021. (vals, Chambers)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 800 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Pabst Brewing Co. with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 799 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrington, Daniel)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 798 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Greif, Inc. with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 797 ORDER denying #688 Defendant American Sugar Refining, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/15/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER granting Defendant Schumacher & Seiler, Inc.'s #515 Motion for Summary Judgment; entering judgment in favor of Schumacher & Seiler, Inc. as to all pending claims against it; and dismissing Schumacher & Seiler, Inc. from this case. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/12/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 794 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/12/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 793 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #792 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The motion does not comply with Local Rule 103.6, which requires that any motion for leave to file an amended pleading be accompanied by the proposed amended pleading. This Court will grant Plaintiff until November 1, 2021 to file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint in full compliance with the Local Rules, and will not issue a scheduling order in this case before that date. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/1/2021. (Gallagher, Stephanie)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 792 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merryman, Matthew)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 791 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #790 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 10/29/2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/21/2021. (vals, Chambers)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 790 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrington, Daniel)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 789 ORDER re #761 Motion for Attorney Fees; DIRECTING #761 motion is DENIED without prejudice as to Citifinancial, Premier, and Bundy, DENIED as to Long & Foster, NL, and Mattress Development Company and GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as to Airgas and Drug City, with sanctions of $70 being awarded against each in favor of Plaintiff; DENYING AS MOOT #779 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/16/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 788 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/16/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 787 ORDER directing Armacell, LLCS Motion to Dismiss, ECF #163 , is GRANTED; Truist Financial Corporations Motion to Dismiss, ECF #174 , is GRANTED; Pabst Brewing Co.s Motion to Dismiss, ECF #287 , is GRANTED; C&I Leasing, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss, ECF #384 , is GRANTED; Cowan Systems, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss, ECF #386 , is GRANTED; Lifoam Industries, LLCS Motions to Dismiss, ECF #411 , #452 , are GRANTED; Highs of Baltimore, LLCs Motion to Dismiss, ECF #425 , is GRANTED; Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnerships Motion to Dismiss, ECF #442 , is GRANTED; Certain Defendants (American Sugar Refining, Inc.; Bob Bell Automotive Group, Inc.; Donohoe Real Estate Services; HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc.; Len Stoler, Inc.; and Stella Maris Operating Corp.) Motion to Dismiss, ECF #448 , is GRANTED; The Rukert Terminals Corporations Motion to Dismiss, ECF #461 , is GRANTED; Alban Tractor Co., Inc.s Motion to Dismiss, ECF #478 , is GRANTED;Crown Central LLCs Motion to Dismiss, ECF #479 , is GRANTED; New Ridge Associates, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss, ECF #480 , is GRANTED; Norris Automotive Holdings, LLCs Motion to Dismiss, ECF #481 , is GRANTED; The Victory Racing Plate Companys Motions to Dismiss, ECF #482 , #484 , are GRANTED; Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss, ECF #510 , is GRANTED ; Caraustar Industries, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss, ECF #537 , is GRANTED; Greif, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss, ECF #539 , is GRANTED; Hilton Worldwide, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss, ECF #609 , is GRANTED; Ridgeway Manor, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss, ECF #672 , is GRANTED; Morgan Properties Management Company, LLCs Motion to Dismiss, ECF #704 , is GRANTED; Airgas, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss, ECF #767 , is GRANTED; Drug City Pharmacy, LLCs Motion to Dismiss, ECF #768 , is GRANTED; Melibelle USA, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss, ECF #769 , is GRANTED; Heritage Chevrolet-Buicks Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF #549 , is GRANTED; Mattress Company of Delaware, LLC d/b/a Eclipse Internationals Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF #701 , is GRANTED; and the remaining alternative motions for summary judgment are DENIED; directing all dismissed claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/16/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 786 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/16/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 785 REPLY to Response to Motion re #768 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgement filed by Drug City Pharmacy, LLC.(Waterworth, Gregory)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 784 REPLY to Response to Motion re #767 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgement filed by Airgas, Inc..(Waterworth, Gregory)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 783 REPLY to Response to Motion re #769 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgement filed by Melibelle USA, Inc..(Waterworth, Gregory)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 781 ORDER re Vorando Realty Trust's #780 Correspondence; dismissing its crossclaims against all defendants without prejudice; terminating Defendant Jotun Paints, Inc. as a party to this litigation. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/10/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 780 Correspondence re: Response to Court's September 3, 2021 Letter Order Requesting Clarification as to Vornado's Intention with Regards to Crossclaims (McKillop, Daniel)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 779 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Reply by Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Sur-Reply, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Casey, Timothy)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER seeking clarification from Defendant Vornado Realty Trust as to is intent to prosecute #185 Crossclaim by deadline set. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/3/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 777 RESPONSE in Opposition re #769 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgement by Defendant Melibelle USA, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Historic Records for Melibelle, #2 Exhibit B - MDAT Records for Plantabbs Corporation, #3 Exhibit C - MDAT Records for Tango Industries, #4 Exhibit D - USPTO Trademark for PROLONG, #5 Exhibit E - MDAT Records for Melibelle USA, Inc., #6 Exhibit F - MDAT Records for Plantabbs Products Trade Name, #7 Exhibit G - 68th Street Site Work Group Executed Assignments, #8 Rule 56(d) Declaration of Rachel D. Guthrie)(Guthrie, Rachel)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 776 RESPONSE in Opposition re #768 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgement by Defendant Drug City Pharmacy, LLC filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Historic Records for Drug City Pharmacy, #2 Exhibit B - MDAT Records for The Drug City Pharmacy Company, #3 Exhibit C - MDAT Records for Drug City Pharmacy, LLC, #4 Exhibit D - Web Archive for Drug City Website, #5 Exhibit E - 68th Street Site Work Group Executed Assignments, #6 Rule 56(d) Declaration of Rachel D. Guthrie)(Guthrie, Rachel)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 775 RESPONSE in Opposition re #767 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgement by Defendant Airgas, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDAT Records for Arundel Sales & Service, #2 Exhibit B - VA SOS Records for Potomac Airgas, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - VA SOS Records for Airgas Mid-Atlantic, Inc., #4 Exhibit D - Historic Records for Airgas, #5 Exhibit E - 68th Street Site Work Group Executed Assignments, #6 Rule 56(d) Declaration of Rachel D. Guthrie)(Guthrie, Rachel)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 774 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #773 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 9/20/2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/31/2021. (vals, Chambers)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 773 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrington, Daniel)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 772 REPLY to Response to Motion re #761 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Reimbursement of Costs for Formal Service and for Seeking Default Against Multiple Defendants filed by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Guthrie, Rachel)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 771 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #770 Motion to Withdraw #761 MOTION for Reimbursement of Costs as it pertains to Defendant Hilton Worldwide Inc., each part to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/24/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 770 Consent MOTION to Withdraw #761 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Reimbursement of Costs for Formal Service and for Seeking Default Against Multiple Defendants as to Defendant Hilton Worldwide, Inc. by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 769 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgement by Melibelle USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Waterworth, Gregory)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 768 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgement by Drug City Pharmacy, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Waterworth, Gregory)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 767 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgement by Airgas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Waterworth, Gregory)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 766 RESPONSE in Opposition re #761 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Reimbursement of Costs for Formal Service and for Seeking Default Against Multiple Defendants filed by Drug City Pharmacy, LLC.(Waterworth, Gregory)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 765 RESPONSE in Opposition re #761 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Reimbursement of Costs for Formal Service and for Seeking Default Against Multiple Defendants filed by Airgas, Inc..(Waterworth, Gregory)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 764 RESPONSE in Opposition re #761 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Reimbursement of Costs for Formal Service and for Seeking Default Against Multiple Defendants filed by NL Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Waterworth, Gregory)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 763 NOTICE by 68th Street Site Work Group of Withdrawal of Appearance of Ambereen K. Shaffie (Shaffie, Ambereen)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 762 RESPONSE in Opposition re #761 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Reimbursement of Costs for Formal Service and for Seeking Default Against Multiple Defendants filed by Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Casey, Timothy)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 761 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Motion for Reimbursement of Costs for Formal Service and for Seeking Default Against Multiple Defendants by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Formal Service Costs by Defendant, #2 Exhibit B - Guthrie Affidavit in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 - to Guthrie Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C - Merryman Affidavit in Support, #5 Exhibit 1 - to Merryman Affidavit, #6 Exhibit D - Citifinancial Waiver Documents, #7 Exhibit E - Hilton Worldwide Waiver Documents, #8 Exhibit F - Long & Foster Waiver Documents, #9 Exhibit G - NL Industries Waiver Documents, #10 Exhibit H - Premier Technology Waiver Documents, #11 Exhibit I - Russell T. Bundy Waiver Documents)(Merryman, Matthew)
August 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 760 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/13/2021, before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Court Reporter Patricia G. Mitchell, 410-962-3858, trish_mitchell@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 93. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/23/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2021.(pm, Court Reporter)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 759 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #758 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 8/30/2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/30/2021. (vals, Chambers)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 758 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrington, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 757 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #702 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Laurence B Orloff. Directing attorney Laurence B Orloff to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/28/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER granting Defendant Drug City Pharmacy, LLC's #722 Motion to Vacate #651 Clerk's Entry of Default, granting Defendant Melibelle USA, Inc.'s #723 Motion to Vacate #655 Clerk's Entry of Default ; granting Defendant Airgas, Inc.'s #724 Motion to Vacate #662 Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/21/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 755 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/21/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 754 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #753 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 7/30/2021.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/19/2021. (vals, Chambers)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 753 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrington, Daniel)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Motions Hearing held on 7/13/2021 re #163 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Armacell, LLC, #287 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Pabst Brewing Co., #384 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant C&I Leasing, Inc., #537 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Caraustar Industries, Inc., and #448 Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment filed by American Sugar Refining, Inc., et al., before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Court Reporter: Patricia Mitchell)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 752 NOTICE by C&I Leasing, Inc. Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fitzgerald, Stephen)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ORDER granting #750 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant The Maryland Management Company. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/8/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 750 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant The Maryland Management Company with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 749 REPLY to Response to Motion re #688 MOTION for Sanctions and Request for Hearing filed by American Sugar Refining, Inc..(Witherup, Margaret)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 748 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #746 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 7/16/2021.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/6/2021. (vals, Chambers)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 747 REPLY to Response to Motion re #704 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blumenfeld, Michael)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 746 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrington, Daniel)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 745 REPLY to Response to Motion re #723 MOTION to Vacate #655 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Melibelle USA, Inc..(Waterworth, Gregory)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 744 REPLY to Response to Motion re #722 MOTION to Vacate #651 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Drug City Pharmacy, LLC.(Waterworth, Gregory)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 743 REPLY to Response to Motion re #724 MOTION to Vacate #662 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Airgas, Inc..(Waterworth, Gregory)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 742 REPLY to Response to Motion re #701 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or for Summary Judgment filed by Eclipse International, Inc..(Maneche, Mark)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 741 ORDER setting telephonic motions hearing. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/29/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER granting #739 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/25/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 739 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 738 PAPERLESS ORDER Approving #737 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/25/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 737 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 736 RESPONSE in Opposition re #688 MOTION for Sanctions and Request for Hearing Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant American Sugar Refining, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Record of Decision Excerpt, #2 Exhibit B - Google Maps for Pulaski Hwy. and 68th Street, #3 Exhibit C - Google Maps Distance Between Robb Tyler Inc. and Fairfield Dump, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Matthew T. Merryman, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Ambereen K. Shaffie)(Merryman, Matthew)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 735 ORDER granting #381 MOTION for More Definite Statement Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e). Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/21/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 734 PAPERLESS ORDER Approving #729 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/21/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 733 RESPONSE in Opposition re #723 MOTION to Vacate #655 Clerk's Entry of Default by Defendant Melibelle USA, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Waiver Cover Letter to Melibelle USA, #2 Exhibit B - USPS Delivery Confirmation for Waiver Package, #3 Exhibit C - June 2021 Emails on Service Reimbursement, #4 Exhibit D - March 2, 2021 Email from W. Wayne Davis, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Settlement Offer Letter to Melibelle USA, #6 Exhibit F - USPS Delivery Confirmation for Settlement Offer Package)(Merryman, Matthew)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 732 RESPONSE in Opposition re #722 MOTION to Vacate #651 Clerk's Entry of Default by Defendant Drug City Pharmacy filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Waiver Cover Letter to Drug City Pharmacy, #2 Exhibit B - USPS Delivery Confirmation for Waiver Package, #3 Exhibit C - Emails with Fotis, #4 Exhibit D - June 2021 Emails on Service Reimbursement, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Settlement Offer Letter to Drug City Pharmacy, #6 Exhibit F - USPS Delivery Confirmation for Settlement Offer Package)(Merryman, Matthew)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 731 RESPONSE in Opposition re #724 MOTION to Vacate #662 Clerk's Entry of Default by Defendant Airgas, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Waiver Package Cover Letter to Airgas, #2 Exhibit B - USPS Delivery Confirmation for Waiver Package, #3 Exhibit C - January 8, 2021 Emails with Doherty, #4 Exhibit D - June 2021 Emails on Service Reimbursement, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Settlement Offer Letter to Airgas, #6 Exhibit F - USPS Delivery Confirmation for Settlement Offer Package)(Merryman, Matthew)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 730 RESPONSE in Opposition re #704 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Historic Records for MPMC, #2 Exhibit B - Morgan Properties Website, #3 Exhibit C - Morgan Properties Website Apartment Listings, #4 Exhibit D - February 9, 1962 Baltimore Sun Article, #5 Exhibit E - Property Records for Forest Heights, #6 Exhibit F - MDAT Records for Forest Heights (Gwynnbrook Apartments Owner LLC), #7 Exhibit G - MDAT Records for Gwynnbrook Townhomes Fictitious Name, #8 Exhibit H - Property Records for Marylander Associates, #9 Exhibit I - MDAT Records for Marylander Associates, #10 Exhibit J - MDAT Records for PR Marylander, LLC, #11 Exhibit K - PREIT 2003 SEC Form 8-K/A Report, #12 Exhibit L - Property Records for University Associates, #13 Exhibit M - MDAT Records for Carlyle Apartments Associates LLC, #14 Exhibit N - Property Records for Westerlee Apartments, #15 Exhibit O - MDAT Records for Westerlee Apartments, #16 Exhibit P - MDAT Records for Morgan Property Management Company, #17 Exhibit Q - Property Records for Westridge Apartments, #18 Exhibit R - Google Maps for Westridge Apartments)(Guthrie, Rachel)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 729 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 728 RESPONSE in Opposition re #701 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or for Summary Judgment by Defendant Eclipse International, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Waiver Package Cover Letter to Eclipse International, #2 Exhibit B - USPS Delivery Confirmation for Waiver Package, #3 Exhibit C - Corporation Trust Letter of March 10, 2021, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Settlement Offer Letter to Eclipse International, #5 Exhibit E - USPS Delivery Confirmation for Settlement Offer, #6 Exhibit F - Historic Records for Eclipse International)(Guthrie, Rachel)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 727 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #726 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 7/2/2021.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/16/2021. (vals, Chambers)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 726 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Farrington, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 725 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HomeServices of America, Inc. for Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc..(Casey, Timothy)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 724 MOTION to Vacate #662 Clerk's Entry of Default by Airgas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Mary C. Doherty, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit 1)(Waterworth, Gregory)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 723 MOTION to Vacate #655 Clerk's Entry of Default by Melibelle USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of W. Wayne Davis, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit 1)(Waterworth, Gregory)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 722 MOTION to Vacate #651 Clerk's Entry of Default by Drug City Pharmacy, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of George Fotis, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2)(Waterworth, Gregory)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 721 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Waterworth on behalf of Melibelle USA, Inc. (Waterworth, Gregory)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 720 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Waterworth on behalf of Drug City Pharmacy, LLC (Waterworth, Gregory)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 719 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Waterworth on behalf of Airgas, Inc. (Waterworth, Gregory)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 718 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas K Prevas on behalf of Drug City Pharmacy, LLC (Prevas, Thomas)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 717 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas K Prevas on behalf of Melibelle USA, Inc. (Prevas, Thomas)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 716 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas K Prevas on behalf of Airgas, Inc. (Prevas, Thomas)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 715 MARGINAL ORDER approving #714 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Aarons, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/14/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 714 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 713 MARGINAL ORDER approving #710 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Carisam-Samuel Meisel (MD), Inc. with prejudice filed by 68th Street Site Work Group; directing #647 Clerk's Entry of Default and #648 Notice of Default are moot. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/10/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER re #711 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Prince Minerals, LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/10/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 711 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 710 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 709 ORDER denying as moot #619 Motion to Dismiss; granting #708 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant NCR Corporation Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/10/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 708 MOTION to Dismiss Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant NCR Corporation without Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 707 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #706 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Zurich American Insurance Co. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/9/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 706 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 705 PAPERLESS ORDER in accordance with Local Rule 105.8 ordering Plaintiff to respond to Defendant American Sugar Refining, Incs Motion for Sanctions, ECF 688, on or before June 23, 2021. Defendant may file a Reply on or before July 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/8/2021. (gbs, Chambers)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 704 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Singer, Jonathan)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 703 RESPONSE re #683 Response in Opposition to Motion, NCR's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by NCR Corporation.(Rauer, Amanda)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 702 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Laurence B. Orloff (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9309505.) by Eclipse International, Inc.(Maneche, Mark)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 701 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or for Summary Judgment by Eclipse International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Maneche, Mark)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 700 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #699 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 6/15/2021.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/2/2021. (vals, Chambers)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 699 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrington, Daniel)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 698 REPLY to Response to Motion re #609 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hilton Worldwide, Inc..(Evans, Gregory)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 697 RESPONSE in Opposition re #672 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant American Sugar Refining, Inc., et al. by Defendant Ridgeway Manor, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Historic Records for Ridgeway Manor)(Merryman, Matthew)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 696 STATUS REPORT by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER rescinding 692 Paperless Order as it pertains to the denial of Jotun Paint, Inc.s #470 motion to dismiss, ONLY. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/27/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 693 MARGINAL ORDER approving #691 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Glen-Gery Corporation; vacating #653 Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/26/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 694 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #690 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Caplan Brothers, Inc.; vacating #664 Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/26/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 692 (RESCINDED per #695 Order as it pertains to the denial of Jotun Paint, Inc.s motion to dismiss, ECF 470, ONLY) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #689 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Jotun Paints, Inc.; denying as moot #470 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/26/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/27/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 691 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 690 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 689 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jotun Paints, Inc. with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 688 MOTION for Sanctions and Request for Hearing by American Sugar Refining, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Witherup, Margaret)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 687 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #686 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 6/1/2021.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/25/2021. (vals, Chambers)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 686 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrington, Daniel)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 685 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Aaron's, Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 5/24/21)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 684 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aaron's, Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 683 RESPONSE in Opposition re #619 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant NCR Corporation filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDAT Records for NCR Entities, #2 Exhibit B - Historic Records for NCR)(Guthrie, Rachel)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 682 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #681 Stipulation filed by Jotun Paints, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/20/2021. (vals, Chambers)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 681 STIPULATION re #567 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, of Extension of Time to File a Reply by Jotun Paints, Inc.(Sher, Joel)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 680 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #679 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Detroit Royalty, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/20/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 679 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 678 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #676 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Asarco LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/18/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 677 RESPONSE in Opposition re #609 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Hilton Worldwide, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shaffie, Ambereen)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 676 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stipulated Order Regarding Voluntary Dismissal of All Claims Against ASARCO LLC) by Asarco LLC(Schmidt, Caroline)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 675 PAPERLESS ORDER finding as moot #598 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot #598 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/17/2021. (vals, Chambers)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 674 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #669 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Bell and Howell, LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/14/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 673 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ridgeway Manor, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Burleigh Enterprises Limited Partnership for Ridgeway Manor, Inc..(Dvornicky, Jared)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 672 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant American Sugar Refining, Inc., et al. by Ridgeway Manor, Inc.(Dvornicky, Jared)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 671 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #668 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to PVH Corp., filed by 68th Street Site Work Group; PVH Corp. terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/14/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 670 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #667 Stipulation of Dismissal of allcross-claims against Defendant Bell and Howell LLC filed by Vornado Realty Trust. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/14/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 669 MOTION to Dismiss Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Bell and Howell, LLC with Prejudice by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 668 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 667 STIPULATION of Dismissal (STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ALL CROSS-CLAIMS FILED BY VORNADO REALTY TRUST AGAINST BELL AND HOWELL, LLC) by Bell and Howell, LLC, Vornado Realty Trust(Haussler, Helyna)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 666 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #657 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Valley Motors, Inc., filed by 68th Street Site Work Group; Valley Motors, Inc., terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/14/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 665 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Caplan Brothers, Inc.
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 664 (VACATED per #694 Order) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Caplan Brothers, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/27/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 663 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Airgas, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 662 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Airgas, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 661 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Russell T. Bundy Associates, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 660 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Russell T. Bundy Associates, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 659 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Premier Technology Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 658 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Premier Technology Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 657 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 656 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Melibelle USA, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 655 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Melibelle USA, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 654 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Glen-Gery Corporation (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 653 (VACATED per #693 Order) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Glen-Gery Corporation (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/27/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 652 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Drug City Pharmacy, LLC (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 651 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Drug City Pharmacy, LLC (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 650 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to CitiFinancial Credit Company (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 649 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CitiFinancial Credit Company (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 648 (MOOT per #713 ORDER) NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Carisam-Samuel Meisel (MD), Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/10/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 647 (MOOT per #713 ORDER) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Carisam-Samuel Meisel (MD), Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/10/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 646 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #645 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant King David at Autumn Lake. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/13/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 645 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 644 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #643 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Lear Corporation. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/12/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 643 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 642 NOTICE by Hilton Worldwide, Inc. re #617 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Schmidt, Caroline)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 641 REPLY to Response to Motion re #549 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment and Joinder of Certain Defendants' Motion filed by Heritage Chevrolet-Buick, Inc..(Dickinson, Michelle)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 640 REPLY to Response to Motion re #539 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Greif, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Dimond, Thomas)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 639 REPLY to Response to Motion re #537 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Caraustar Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Dimond, Thomas)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 638 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #637 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/10/2021. (vals, Chambers)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 637 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrington, Daniel)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 636 REPLY TO RESPONSE re #411 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lifoam Industries, LLC.(Gendron, Andrew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 635 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Russell T. Bundy Associates, Inc. by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit in Support)(Merryman, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 634 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Premier Technology Inc. by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit in Support)(Merryman, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 633 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Melibelle USA, Inc. by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit in Support)(Merryman, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 632 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Glen-Gery Corporation by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit in Support)(Merryman, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 631 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Drug City Pharmacy, LLC by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit in Support)(Merryman, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 630 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Citifinancial Credit Company by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit in Support)(Merryman, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 629 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Carisam-Samuel Meisel (MD), Inc. by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit in Support)(Merryman, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 628 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Caplan Brothers, Inc. by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit in Support)(Merryman, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 627 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Airgas, Inc. by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit in Support)(Merryman, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 626 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by 68th Street Site Work Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit in Support)(Merryman, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 625 REPLY to Response to Motion re #479 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Crown Central LLC.(Waterworth, Gregory)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 624 REPLY to Response to Motion re #484 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by The Victory Racing Plate Company.(Waterworth, Gregory)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 623 REPLY to Response to Motion re #481 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Norris Automotive Holdings LLC.(Waterworth, Gregory)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 622 REPLY to Response to Motion re #480 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by New Ridge Associates, Inc..(Waterworth, Gregory)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 621 REPLY to Response to Motion re #478 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Alban Tractor Co., Inc..(Waterworth, Gregory)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 620 Local Rule, Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by NCR Corporation (Rauer, Amanda)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 619 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by NCR Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1)(Rauer, Amanda)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 618 QC NOTICE re: #617 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Hilton Worldwide, Inc. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Exhibit list referenced on Disclosure Form. To correct this problem, please file the Exhibit list using the event Notice (Other) and link the Exhibit list to #617 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. Only the Exhibit list attachment needs to be filed using the "Notice" event. You do not have to re-file the Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure nor do you have re-enter names of entities. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 617 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hilton Worldwide, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate American Plaza Parking LLC, Other Affiliate A-R HHC Orlando Convention Hotel Member, LLC, Other Affiliate A-R HHC Orlando Convention Hotel Mezz, LLC, Other Affiliate A-R HHC Orlando Convention Hotel, LLC, Other Affiliate A-R HHC Orlando New Parcel Owner, LLC, Other Affiliate Ashford HHC Partners III LP, Other Affiliate Atlanta Airport Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Austin Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Bonnet Creek Equity Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Bonnet Creek Hilton Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Boston Airport Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate BRE/FL Development Parcels L.L.C., Other Affiliate Buckinghams Chicago, LLC, Other Affiliate Casa Marina Equity Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Casa Marina Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Casa Marina Owner, LLC, Other Affiliate Chesapeake Lodging, L.P., Other Affiliate CHH Capital Hotel GP, LLC, Other Affiliate CHH Capital Hotel Partners, LP, Other Affiliate CHH Capital Tenant Corp., Other Affiliate CHH III Tenant Parent Corp., Other Affiliate CHH Torrey Pines Hotel GP, LLC, Other Affiliate CHH Torrey Pines Hotel Partners, LP, Other Affiliate CHH Torrey Pines Tenant Corp., Other Affiliate Chicago Hilton LLC, Other Affiliate Chicago Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP 31st Street LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP 36th Street LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Boston II LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Boston LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Bridge Lender LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Chicago LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP DC Holding Trust, Other Affiliate CHSP Denver LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Fisherman Wharf LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP French Quarter LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Lakeshore LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Los Angeles II LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Los Angeles LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Miami Beach Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Mission Bay LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Navy Yard LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP New Orleans LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Newton LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP San Diego LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP San Francisco LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Seattle LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS 31st Street LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS 36th Street LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Boston II LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Boston LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Chicago LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Denver LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Fisherman Wharf LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS French Quarter LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Lakeshore LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Los Angeles II LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Los Angeles LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Mission Bay LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Navy Yard LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS New Orleans LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Newton LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS San Diego LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS San Francisco LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Seattle LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Union Square II LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP TRS Union Square LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Union Square II LLC, Other Affiliate CHSP Union Square LLC, Other Affiliate Club Mack OPCO, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Crystal City Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Crystal City LLC, Other Affiliate Cupertino Hotel Owner LLC, Other Affiliate Cupertino Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate DC Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate DJONT Leasing L.L.C., Other Affiliate Doubletree DTWC LLC, Other Affiliate Doubletree Spokane City Center LLC, Other Affiliate DR Spokane City Center LLC, Other Affiliate DT Ontario GP LLC, Other Affiliate DT Ontario Hotel Partners, Other Affiliate DT Ontario Hotel Partners Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate DT Spokane Equity Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate DTR TM Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate DTWC Spokane City Center SPE, LLC, Other Affiliate Durango Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate EPT Kansas City Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate EPT Meadowlands Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Fess Parker-Red Lion Hotel, Other Affiliate G/B/H Condo Owner, LLC, Other Affiliate G/B/H Four Star, LLC, Other Affiliate G/B/H Golf Course, LLC, Other Affiliate Global Resort Partners, Other Affiliate Global Resort Partners GP LLC, Other Affiliate Hapeville Hotel Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate HHC One Park Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton Brazil Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton CMBS Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton El Segundo LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton Embassy Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton Hawaiian Village Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton Hawaiian Village LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton International of Puerto Rico Inc., Other Affiliate Hilton Land Investment 1, LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton New Orleans, LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton OPB, LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton Orlando Partners III, LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton Riverside, LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton Seattle Airport LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton Suites, LLC, Other Affiliate HLT Alexandria Equity Holding LLC, Other Affiliate HLT CA Hilton LLC, Other Affiliate HLT DC Owner LLC, Other Affiliate HLT Domestic Owner LLC, Other Affiliate HLT GP LLC, Other Affiliate HLT Hawaii Holding LLC, Other Affiliate HLT Logan LLC, Other Affiliate HLT Memphis LLC, Other Affiliate HLT NY Hilton LLC, Other Affiliate HLT NY Waldorf LLC, Other Affiliate HLT Operate DTWC LLC, Other Affiliate HLT Owned VIII Holding LLC, Other Affiliate HLT Property Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate HLT Resorts GP LLC, Other Affiliate HLT San Jose LLC, Other Affiliate International Rivercenter, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Kansas City Plaza Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate KC Plaza GP LLC, Other Affiliate Kenner Hotel Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Key West Reach Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Key West Reach Owner, LLC, Other Affiliate King Street Station Hotel Associates L.P., Other Affiliate King Street Station Hotel Associates Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Kitty OSheas Chicago, LLC, Other Affiliate Lake Buena Vista Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Las Vegas Hotel Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate McLean Hilton LLC, Other Affiliate McLean Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Meritex, LLC, Other Affiliate Miami Airport Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Miami Airport LLC, Other Affiliate New Orleans Airport Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate New Orleans Rivercenter, Other Affiliate New Orleans Riverside Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate New York Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate NORC Riparian Property, LLC, Other Affiliate Oakbrook Hilton Suites & Garden Inn LLC, Other Affiliate Oakland Airport Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate One Park Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate P55 Hotel Owner LLC, Other Affiliate Parc 55 Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Park Ala Moana LLC, Other Affiliate Park DT Ontario Lessee Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Park Embassy Alexandria Lessee Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Park Intermediate Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Park LA Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Park Las Vegas Lessee Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Park NO Airport GP LLC, Other Affiliate Park TRS II Operating Company, Other Affiliate Park TRS Operating Company, Other Affiliate Park US Lessee Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Park Victoria Quays Lessee Limited, Other Affiliate Park-OCCC Hotel, Inc., Other Affiliate Parsippany Hotel Owner LLC, Other Affiliate Parsippany Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Phoenix Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Phoenix SP Hilton LLC, Other Affiliate PK Domestic Holdco LLC, Other Affiliate PK Domestic Property LLC, Other Affiliate PK Domestic Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate PK Domestic REIT Inc., Other Affiliate PK Domestic Sub LLC, Other Affiliate PK Finance Co-Issuer Inc., Other Affiliate Pointe Squaw Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Puerto Rico Caribe Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Reach Equity Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate RP Holdings Trust, Other Affiliate RP Hotel Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate RP Hotel Operating Co., Inc., Other Affiliate S.F. Hilton LLC, Other Affiliate San Diego Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate San Francisco Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate San Jose Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Santa Barbara Hotel Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Santa Barbara JV Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Santa Barbara Lessee Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Seattle Airport DT Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Seattle Airport HLT Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Short Hills Hilton LLC, Other Affiliate Short Hills Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Sonoma Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Suite Life LLC, Other Affiliate Sunstone Park Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Tex Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Waikoloa Village Lessee LLC, Other Affiliate Salt Lake City Lessee LLC for Hilton Worldwide, Inc..(Schmidt, Caroline)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 616 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Asarco LLC identifying Corporate Parent Asarco Incorporated, Other Affiliate ASARCO USA Incorporated, Other Affiliate Americas Mining Corporation, Other Affiliate Grupo Mexico S.A.B. de C.V. for Asarco LLC.(Schmidt, Caroline)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 615 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #614 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Co. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/5/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 614 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 613 QC NOTICE: #608 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Hilton Worldwide, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file and enter the names of entities into the CM/ECF system when prompted. Thank you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 612 QC NOTICE: #606 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Asarco LLC was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file and enter the names of entities into the CM/ECF system when prompted. Thank you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 611 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #605 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Tanya L Greene. Directing attorney Tanya L Greene to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/5/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 610 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #604 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gregory Evans. Directing attorney Gregory Evans to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/5/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 609 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hilton Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Caroline)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 608 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hilton Worldwide, Inc. (Schmidt, Caroline) Modified on 5/5/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 607 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Asarco LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Caroline)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 606 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Asarco LLC (Schmidt, Caroline) Modified on 5/5/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 605 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tanya L. Greene (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9259214.) by Asarco LLC, Hilton Worldwide, Inc.(Schmidt, Caroline)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 604 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregory Evans (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9259212.) by Asarco LLC, Hilton Worldwide, Inc.(Schmidt, Caroline)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 603 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #602 Stipulation filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/3/2021. (vals, Chambers)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 602 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by 68th Street Site Work Group(Singer, Jonathan)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 601 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #600 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/3/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 600 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 599 REPLY to Response to Motion re #387 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimMemorandum in Support of Motion, #386 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Cowan Systems, Inc..(Gorski, Anthony)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 598 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bell and Howell, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 1A, #5 Exhibit 1B, #6 Exhibit 1C, #7 Exhibit 1D, #8 Exhibit 1E, #9 Exhibit 1F, #10 Exhibit 1G, #11 Exhibit 1H)(Haussler, Helyna)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 597 REPLY to Response to Motion re #515 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Schumacher & Seiler, Inc..(Youssef, Matthew)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 596 RESPONSE in Opposition re #549 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment and Joinder of Certain Defendants' Motion by Defendant Heritage Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Historic Records for Heritage Chevrolet-Buick)(Guthrie, Rachel)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 595 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #594 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Eagle Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/28/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 594 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 593 REPLY to Response to Motion re #461 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by The Rukert Terminals Corporation.(Jackson, Jennifer)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 592 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #589 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/28/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 591 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #590 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Visual Marking Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/28/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 590 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 589 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER setting deadline for Plaintiff to file motion for entry of default and motion for default judgment, or provide a report as to why such motions would be inappropriate as to Defendants listed therein; further directing plaintiff provide a report on the status of service of defendants Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Prince Minerals, LLC, and Visual Marking Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/28/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 587 REPLY to Response to Motion re #425 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by High's of Baltimore, LLC.(Leiter, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 586 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #584 Stipulation filed by Jotun Paints, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/27/2021. (vals, Chambers)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 585 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #582 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Elg Metals, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/27/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 584 STIPULATION re #567 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, of Extension of Time to File a Reply by Jotun Paints, Inc.(Sher, Joel)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 583 REPLY to Response to Motion re #510 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor in the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc..(Thompson, Gary)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 582 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 581 RESPONSE in Opposition re #539 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Greif, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDAT Records for Chesapeake Paperboard Company, #2 Exhibit B - DDOC Results for "Caraustar Custom Packaging Group", #3 Exhibit C - DDOC Record for GPI Converting, LLC, #4 Exhibit D - MDAT Search for "GPI Converting", #5 Exhibit E - MDAT Records for Graphic Packaging International, LLC, #6 Exhibit F - Georgia Secretary of State Records for Caraustar Industries, Inc., #7 Exhibit G - LWD Site Administrative Settlement Agreement and Order on Consent for Removal Action)(Guthrie, Rachel)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 580 RESPONSE in Opposition re #537 MOTION to Dismiss by Caraustar Industries, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDAT Records for Chesapeake Paperboard Company, #2 Exhibit B - Historic Records for Chesapeake Paperboard, #3 Exhibit C - DDOC Results for "Caraustar Custom Packaging Group", #4 Exhibit D - DDOC Record for GPI Converting, LLC, #5 Exhibit E - MDAT Search for "GPI Converting", #6 Exhibit F - MDAT Records for Graphic Packaging International, LLC, #7 Exhibit G - Georgia Secretary of State Records for Caraustar Industries, Inc., #8 Exhibit H - LWD Site Administrative Settlement Agreement and Order on Consent for Removal Action)(Guthrie, Rachel)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 579 REPLY to Response to Motion re #448 MOTION to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum filed by American Sugar Refining, Inc., Bob Bell Automotive Group, Inc., Donohoe Real Estate Services, HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc., Len Stoler, Inc., Maryland Management Company, Stella Maris Operating Corp..(Witherup, Margaret)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 578 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #576 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant TreeHouse Private Brands, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/26/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 577 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #575 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant US Foods, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/26/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 576 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 575 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 574 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #573 Stipulation filed by Eclipse International, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/26/2021. (vals, Chambers)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 573 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Extending Time to Respond by Eclipse International, Inc.(Maneche, Mark)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 572 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #571 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 5/10/2021.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/26/2021. (vals, Chambers)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 571 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrington, Daniel)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 570 REPLY to Response to Motion re #384 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by C&I Leasing, Inc..(Fitzgerald, Stephen)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 569 RESPONSE in Opposition re #461 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by Defendant Rukert Terminals Corporation filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Historic Records for Rukert Terminals)(Guthrie, Rachel)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 568 RESPONSE in Opposition re #479 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Defendant Crown Central LLC filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Historic Records for Crown Central, LLC)(Shaffie, Ambereen)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 567 RESPONSE in Opposition re #470 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Jotun Paints, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-MD Secretary of State Listing for Baltimore Paint Company, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Baltimore Evening Sun Job Listing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Baltimore Sun News Article, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-Baltimore Sun News Article, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E-Baltimore Sun News Article, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F-The Evening Sun News Article, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G-MD Secretary of State Listing for Jotun Marine Coatings, Inc., #8 Exhibit Exhibit H-NC Dept. of Agriculture Pesticide Report, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I-EPA Press Release, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J-U.S. v. Dickerson, 640 F.Supp. 448 (D. MD. 1986), #11 Exhibit Exhibit K-Jotun Group Marketing Materials, #12 Exhibit L-NY Secretary of State Listing for Jotun Marine Coatings, Inc., #13 Exhibit Exhibit M-Jotun Paints Website Worldwide Locations and Subsidiaries)(Shaffie, Ambereen)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 566 RESPONSE in Opposition re #480 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Historic Records for New Ridge Associates)(Merryman, Matthew)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 565 RESPONSE in Opposition re #484 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Historic Records for Victory Racing)(Merryman, Matthew)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 564 RESPONSE in Opposition re #481 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Historic Records for Norris Auto, #2 Exhibit B - MDAT Records for George R. Norris, #3 Exhibit C - MDAT for Trade Name Norris Ford, #4 Exhibit D - MDAT Records for Norris-Colonial LLC, #5 Exhibit E - MDAT Records for Norris Family Holdings LLC, #6 Exhibit F - MDAT Records for Norris Automotive)(Merryman, Matthew)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 563 RESPONSE in Opposition re #478 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDAT Records for Alban Tractor, #2 Exhibit B - Historic Records for Alban Tractor)(Merryman, Matthew)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 562 REPLY to Response to Motion re #381 MOTION for More Definite Statement Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) filed by 7-Eleven, Inc..(Salaheldin, Maram)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 561 MARGINAL ORDER approving #560 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Kmart Corporation. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/21/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 560 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 559 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jerry's Chevrolet, Inc. (Freeman, Steven)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 558 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #554 Stipulation filed by Cowan Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/19/2021. (val, Chambers)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 557 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Heritage Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Atlantic Automotive Corp. for Heritage Chevrolet-Buick, Inc..(Dickinson, Michelle)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 556 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #552 Stipulation re #411 MOTION to Dismiss for Extension of Time to File Reply filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, Lifoam Industries, LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/19/2021. (val, Chambers)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 555 REPLY to Response to Motion re #442 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership.(Karpook, Russell)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 554 STIPULATION re #386 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Ext of Time to File Reply Brief in support of Motion by Cowan Systems, Inc.(Gorski, Anthony)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 553 REPLY to Response to Motion re #448 MOTION to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum, #384 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Caraustar Industries, Inc., Greif, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dimond, Thomas)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 552 STIPULATION re #411 MOTION to Dismiss for Extension of Time to File Reply by 68th Street Site Work Group, Lifoam Industries, LLC(Gendron, Andrew)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 551 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #550 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #448 MOTION to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/16/2021. (vals, Chambers)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 550 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #521 Response in Opposition to Motion,, until April 26, 2021 by American Sugar Refining, Inc., Bob Bell Automotive Group, Inc., Donohoe Real Estate Services, HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc., Len Stoler, Inc., Maryland Management Company, Stella Maris Operating Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Witherup, Margaret)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 549 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment and Joinder of Certain Defendants' Motion by Heritage Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Fader Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Fader Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Fader Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Fader Affidavit, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Fader Affidavit, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Fader Affidavit, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Fader Affidavit, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Fader Affidavit, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Venture Sales SDAT Screenshots, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Bud Schmidt SDAT Screenshots, #12 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Dickinson, Michelle)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 548 RESPONSE in Opposition re #515 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Schumacher and Seiler, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDAT Records for Rufus, Inc. fka Schumacher and Seiler, Inc., #2 Exhibit B - MDAT Records for Schumacher and Seiler, Inc. fka Simeon, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - Historic Records for Schumacher & Seiler, #4 Exhibit D - RI/FS AOC, #5 Exhibit E - RD/RA Consent Decree, Appendix D, #6 Exhibit F - Redacted Offer Letter to Schumacher & Seiler)(Guthrie, Rachel)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 547 RESPONSE in Opposition re #510 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by Defendant Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Shaffie, Ambereen)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 546 MARGINAL ORDER approving #545 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Koros, LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/14/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 545 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 544 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #542 Stipulation filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/13/2021. (vals, Chambers)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 543 RESPONSE in Opposition re #425 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Guthrie, Rachel)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 542 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation between Plaintiff 68th Street Site Work Group and Defendant The Rukert Terminals Corporation, for an Extension of Time to File a Response Brief by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 541 MARGINAL ORDER approving re #540 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant National Institutes of Health. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/13/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 539 MOTION to Dismiss by Greif, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Greif, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Dimond, Thomas)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 538 RESPONSE in Opposition re #411 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant Lifoam Industries, LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Merryman, Matthew)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 537 MOTION to Dismiss by Caraustar Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Caraustar Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support of Defendant Caraustar Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Dimond, Thomas)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 536 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #535 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/12/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 535 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 534 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #533 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 4/26/2021.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/9/2021. (vals, Chambers)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 533 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Second) by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrington, Daniel)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 532 RESPONSE in Opposition re #381 MOTION for More Definite Statement Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) filed by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Merryman, Matthew)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Jerry's Chevrolet, Inc..(Freeman, Steven)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 530 RESPONSE in Opposition re #387 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimMemorandum in Support of Motion, #386 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Historic Records for W. T. Cowan Inc., #2 Exhibit B - MDAT Records for Key Way Transport, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - MDAT Records for Key Warehouse Services, Inc., #4 Exhibit D - MDAT Records for Ty Pruitt Trucking, Inc., #5 Exhibit E - MDAT Records for Pruitt Trucking, Inc. f/k/a Cowan Transportation, Inc., #6 Exhibit F - 1992 ICC Register for Cowan Transportation, #7 Exhibit G - MDAT Records for W. T. Cowan Inc. Nexus Address, #8 Exhibit H - Ohio SOS Records for Transmodal Acquisition Corp., #9 Exhibit I - MDAT Record of Forfeiture of Cowan Enterprises, Inc., #10 Exhibit J - MDAT Results for "Cowan Systems" Entities, #11 Exhibit K - MDAT Results for "Cowan" Entities)(Guthrie, Rachel)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 529 RESPONSE in Opposition re #384 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant C&I Leasing, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Historic Records for C&I Leasing Entities)(Shaffie, Ambereen)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 528 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #527 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Poly-Seal LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/7/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 527 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 526 RESPONSE in Opposition re #452 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant American Sugar Refining, Inc., et al. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Historic Records for Lifoam Industries, LLC)(Merryman, Matthew)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 525 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #524 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Pactiv LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/6/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 524 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 523 RESPONSE in Opposition re #442 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Historic Records for Cloverland Dairy)(Guthrie, Rachel)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 522 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #520 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer NCR Corporation answer due 5/7/2021.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/5/2021. (vals, Chambers)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 521 RESPONSE in Opposition re #448 MOTION to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Certain Defendants filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Historic Records for American Sugar, #2 Exhibit B - Historic Records for Bob Bell, #3 Exhibit C - Historic Records for Donohoe, #4 Exhibit D - Historic Records for HMS Host, #5 Exhibit E - Historic Records for Len Stoler, #6 Exhibit F - Historic Records for Maryland Management, #7 Exhibit G - Historic Records for Stella Maris, #8 Exhibit H - EPA Record of Decision Excerpt, #9 Exhibit I - EPA Presumptive Remedy for CERCLA Municipal Landfill Sites)(Guthrie, Rachel)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 520 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by NCR Corporation(Rauer, Amanda)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 519 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #518 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Hampshire Industries, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/5/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 518 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 517 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #516 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC answer due 5/5/2021.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/2/2021. (vals, Chambers)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 516 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC(Singer, Jonathan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 515 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schumacher & Seiler, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Youssef, Matthew)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 514 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Raymond James & Associates, Inc. served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 513 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc. (Thompson, Gary)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 512 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lebanon Seaboard Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Parsells, David)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 511 PAPERLESS ORDER re #507 and #508 Notices of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendants Genesco Inc. and Legg Mason, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/31/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/31/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 510 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Gary)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and Affirmative Defenses by Lebanon Seaboard Corporation.(Carrier, William)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 508 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 507 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 506 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #505 Stipulation filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/30/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 505 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation between Plaintiff and Defendant Jotun Paints, Inc. by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 504 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #498 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant American Express Company. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/30/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 503 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #496 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant A&M (2015) LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/30/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 502 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #500 Stipulation filed by Eclipse International, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/30/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 501 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #497 Stipulation, filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/30/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 500 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Extending Time to Respond by Eclipse International, Inc.(Maneche, Mark)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 499 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D Maneche on behalf of Eclipse International, Inc. (Maneche, Mark)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 498 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 497 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation between Plaintiff and Defendants Alban Tractor Co., Inc., Crown Central LLC, Norris Automotive Holdings LLC, New Ridge Associates, Inc. and The Victory Racing Plate Company by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 496 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 495 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #494 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Burt Rigid Box, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/29/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 494 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 493 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lindsay Rauer on behalf of NCR Corporation (Rauer, Amanda)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc..(Casey, Timothy)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER re #490 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Penske Logistics LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/26/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 490 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 489 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #487 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Lifetouch National School Studios, LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/26/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 488 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #483 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher A. Mitchell. Directing attorney Christopher A. Mitchell to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/26/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 487 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Corrected Memorandum re #461 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by The Rukert Terminals Corporation.(Jackson, Jennifer)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 485 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Rukert Terminals Corporation (Jackson, Jennifer)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Corrected Joinder MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by The Victory Racing Plate Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of David McBride, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Waterworth, Gregory)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 483 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher A. Mitchell (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9183696.) by A&M (2015) LLC(Redway, H)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 482 Joinder MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by The Victory Racing Plate Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of David McBride, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Waterworth, Gregory)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 481 Joinder MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Norris Automotive Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waterworth, Gregory) Modified on 3/26/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Joinder MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by New Ridge Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Brian Darnell, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Waterworth, Gregory) Modified on 3/26/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 479 Joinder MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Crown Central LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Carol L. Bowmmel, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Waterworth, Gregory)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 478 Joinder MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Alban Tractor Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waterworth, Gregory)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 477 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Alban Tractor Co., Inc. (Waterworth, Gregory)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 476 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by New Ridge Associates, Inc. (Waterworth, Gregory)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 475 (FILED IN ERROR under wrong Defendant- Counsel refiled) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Norris Automotive Holdings LLC (Waterworth, Gregory) Modified on 3/26/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 474 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Norris Automotive Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent Norris Family Holding LLC, Other Affiliate Norris Colonial LLC for Norris Automotive Holdings LLC.(Waterworth, Gregory)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 473 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Victory Racing Plate Company identifying Corporate Parent Whitewood Stable Inc. for The Victory Racing Plate Company.(Waterworth, Gregory)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 472 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Crown Central LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rosemore Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Rosemore, Inc., Corporate Parent Crown Central New Holdings LLC for Crown Central LLC.(Waterworth, Gregory)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 471 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Nicole Lipkowitz on behalf of Crown Central LLC (Lipkowitz, Michelle)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 470 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jotun Paints, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Charles S. Pope, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Sher, Joel)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 469 QC NOTICE: #464 Memorandum filed by The Rukert Terminals Corporation was filed incorrectly. **Memorandum should have been filed as an attachment to the original motion. Please note for future. No further action required at this time. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 468 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #466 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Eby-Brown Company, LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/24/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 467 Correspondence re: /Seamus Curley letter requesting removal from the ECF Notifications system for this case for Seamus Curley and Eric S. Aronson (Curley, Seamus)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 466 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 465 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Lake on behalf of American Sugar Refining, Inc., Bob Bell Automotive Group, Inc., Donohoe Real Estate Services, HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc. (Lake, Lauren)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 464 Memorandum in support of #461 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by The Rukert Terminals Corporation.(Jackson, Jennifer) Modified on 3/24/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 461 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by The Rukert Terminals Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Jennifer)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 463 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #456 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Universal Music Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/23/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 462 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #455 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Tektronix, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/23/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 460 REPLY to Response to Motion re #287 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Pabst Brewing Co..(Demirjian, Heather)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 459 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #458 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/23/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 458 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Asarco LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Caroline)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 457 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Susan Schmidt on behalf of Asarco LLC (Schmidt, Caroline)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 456 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 455 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER re #450 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Mondelez International, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/23/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 453 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Eclipse International, Inc. served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 452 JOINDER MOTION re Motion Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant American Sugar Refining, Inc., et al. by Lifoam Industries, LLC(Gendron, Andrew)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership identifying Corporate Parent Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Two Farms, Inc., Other Affiliate Cloverland Management Corporation, Other Affiliate Cloverland Real Estate I LLC, Other Affiliate Cloverland Real Estate II LLC, Other Affiliate Cloverland Real Estate III LLC, Other Affiliate Blowmolders, Inc for Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership.(Karpook, Russell)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 450 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 449 QC NOTICE: #443 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file and enter all names of affiliations into the CM/ECF system when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MOTION to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum by American Sugar Refining, Inc., Bob Bell Automotive Group, Inc., Donohoe Real Estate Services, HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc., Len Stoler, Inc., Maryland Management Company, Stella Maris Operating Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Witherup, Margaret)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Host International, Inc. for HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc..(Witherup, Margaret)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 446 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bob Bell Automotive Group, Inc. (Witherup, Margaret)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 445 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Donohoe Real Estate Services identifying Corporate Parent Donohoe Real Estate Services for Donohoe Real Estate Services.(Witherup, Margaret)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American Sugar Refining, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ASR Group International, Inc. for American Sugar Refining, Inc..(Witherup, Margaret)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 443 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership (Karpook, Russell) Modified on 3/22/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 442 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Karpook, Russell)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 441 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell David Karpook on behalf of Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership (Karpook, Russell)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 440 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Maryland Management Company (Morgan, Lisa) Modified on 5/24/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 439 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #437 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, and #438 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendants Ceres Marine Terminals Inc. and Unilever United States, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/19/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 438 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 437 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 436 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #435 Stipulation for an Extension of Time to File a Response and Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/19/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 435 STIPULATION between Plaintiff 68th Street Site Work Group and Defendant High's of Baltimore, LLC for an Extension of Time to File a Response and Reply Brief by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 434 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #431 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group and approving #432 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendants Bob Davidson Ford, Inc. and Bunge North America (East). Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/17/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 433 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #427 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeffrey Laurence Leiter. Directing attorney Jeffrey Laurence Leiter to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/17/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 432 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 431 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 430 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #429 Stipulation for an extension of time until April 12, 2021, to file a response re #411 . Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/17/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 429 STIPULATION Between Plaintiff 68th Street Site Work Group and Defendant Lifoam Industries, LLC, for an Extension of Time to File a Response Brief by 68th Street Site Work Group(Merryman, Matthew)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 428 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by High's of Baltimore, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Carroll Independent Fuel, LLC for High's of Baltimore, LLC.(Alfano, Alphonse)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey L. Leiter (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9164862.) by High's of Baltimore, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alfano, Alphonse)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 426 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 425 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by High's of Baltimore, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Alfano, Alphonse)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 424 NOTICE of Appearance by Alphonse Michael Alfano on behalf of High's of Baltimore, LLC (Alfano, Alphonse)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 423 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #410 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Karen Palladino Ciccone. Directing attorney Karen Palladino Ciccone to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 422 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #409 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Hannah Bloink. Directing attorney Hannah Bloink to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 421 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #408 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John F Cermak, Jr. Directing attorney John F Cermak, Jr to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 420 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #399 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Cameron A Welch. Directing attorney Cameron A Welch to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 419 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #383 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joel L. Herz. Directing attorney Joel L. Herz to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 418 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #416 Joint Stipulation between Plaintiff and Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/15/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 417 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #415 Joint Stipulation between Plaintiff and Defendant Cowan Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/15/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 416 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation between Plaintiff and Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. by 68th Street Site Work Group(Shaffie, Ambereen)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 415 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation between Plaintiff and Defendant Cowan Systems, Inc. by 68th Street Site Work Group(Shaffie, Ambereen)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 414 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #413 Stipulation for extension of time to file response and reply briefs re #384 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by C&I Leasing, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/15/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 413 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation between Plaintiff and Defendant C&I Leasing, Inc. by 68th Street Site Work Group(Shaffie, Ambereen)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 412 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lifoam Industries, LLC (Gendron, Andrew)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MOTION to Dismiss by Lifoam Industries, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Gendron, Andrew)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 410 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Karen Palladino Ciccone (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9160734.) by HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc.(Witherup, Margaret)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hannah Bloink (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9160706.) by HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc.(Witherup, Margaret)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 408 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John F. Cermak, Jr. (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9160669.) by HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc.(Witherup, Margaret)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 407 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #406 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Benjamin Moore & Co. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/15/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 406 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 405 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #400 Stipulation filed by HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/15/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by NL Industries, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Valhi, Inc. for NL Industries, Inc..(Waterworth, Gregory)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 403 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #373 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David J. Parsells. Directing attorney David J. Parsells to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2021. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 402 QC NOTICE: #389 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by NL Industries, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file and enter affiliation "Valhi, Inc." into the system when prompted. This must be entered at the time the event is used/filed for the system to cross-reference. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 401 QC NOTICE: #387 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cowan Systems, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **This was a MEMORANDUM in Support of #386 motion and was filed using the event for a new Motion in error. The Memorandum should have been filed as an Attachment to the original #386 Motion. The clerk has made corrections and terminated the motion filed in error. Please note for future that all memorandums and exhibits to motions are to be filed as attachments to the motion and not as a new separate entry. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 400 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc.(Witherup, Margaret)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cameron A. Welch (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9157517.) by Pabst Brewing Co.(Jones, Harry)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 398 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #341 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David R Tripp. Directing attorney David R Tripp to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2021. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 397 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #325 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen E Fitzgerald. Directing attorney Stephen E Fitzgerald to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2021. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 396 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #394 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/12/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 395 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #391 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Coach USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/12/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Raymond James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farrington, Daniel)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 393 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Kmart Corporation served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Chiquita Brands LLC identifying Corporate Parent Chiquita Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Chiquita Brands LLC, Other Affiliate Agricola Bananera Santa Rita de RL, Other Affiliate Agroindustria Santa Rosa de Lima, S.A., Other Affiliate Alama Land Company, Other Affiliate American Produce Company, Other Affiliate Americana de Exportacion S.A., Other Affiliate ASD de Venezuela, S.A., Other Affiliate B C Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Charagres, Inc. S.A., Other Affiliate Chiquita Brands Costa Rica Sociedad de Responsibilidad Limitada, Other Affiliate Chiquita (Canada) Inc., Other Affiliate Chiquita Banana Ecuador CB Brands S.A., Other Affiliate Chiquita Brands International Sarl, Other Affiliate Chiquita Brands International, Inc., Other Affiliate Chiquita Compagnie des Bananas, Other Affiliate Chiquita Europe B.V., Other Affiliate Chiquita Finance Company Limited, Other Affiliate Chiquita Fresh North America LLC, Other Affiliate Chiquita Guatemala, S.A., Other Affiliate Chiquita Holding S.A., Other Affiliate Chiquita Honduras Company Ltd., Other Affiliate Chiquita Logistic Services El Salvador Ltda., Other Affiliate Chiquita Logistic Services Guatemala, Limitada, Other Affiliate Chiquita Logistic Services, Honduras, S. de. R.L., Other Affiliate Chiquita Mexico, S. de R. L. de C.V., Other Affiliate Chiquita Panama LLC, Other Affiliate ChiquitaTropical Fruit Company B.V., Other Affiliate Chiquita Tropical Ingredients, Sociedada Anonima, Other Affiliate Chiquita US Corporation, Other Affiliate Chiriqui Land Company, Other Affiliate CILPAC Establishment, Other Affiliate Compania Agricola de Nipe S.A., Other Affiliate Compania Agricola e Industrial Ecuaplanation S.A., Other Affiliate Compania Agricola Sancti-Spiritus S.A., Other Affiliate Compania Bananera de Costa Rica S.A., Other Affiliate Compania Bananera La Ensenada S. de R.L., Other Affiliate Compania Coronas, S.A., Other Affiliate Compania Cubana de Navegacion Costanera, Other Affiliate Compania Frutera America S.A., Other Affiliate Compania La Cruz, S.A., Other Affiliate Companie Productos Agricola de Chiapas, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Compania Tropical de Segoros, S.A., Other Affiliate Dearollos Agroindustriales del Istmo, S. de R.L., Other Affiliate Fresh Express Incorporated, Other Affiliate Fresh Express Vegetable LLC, Other Affiliate Frutas Elegantes, S. de R.L. de C.V., Other Affiliate GWF Management Services Ltd., Other Affiliate GWF White Fleet Liner Services Ltd., Other Affiliate Great White Fleet Ltd., Other Affiliate Great White Fleet Corp., Other Affiliate Ilara Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Istmo Holding LLC One, Other Affiliate Istmo Holding LLC Two, Other Affiliate Istmo Holding LLC Two, Other Affiliate La Ensenada Holding LLC One, Other Affiliate Procesados IQF, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Santa Rita Holding LLC One, Other Affiliate Santa Rita Holding LLC Two, Other Affiliate Servicios de Logitica Chiquita, S.A., Other Affiliate Servicios de Logiticos Chiquita, S.A., Other Affiliate St. James Investments, Inc., Other Affiliate Three Sisters Holding LLC, Other Affiliate TransFRESH Corporation, Other Affiliate Tropical Fresh Trading Establishment, Other Affiliate UNIPO G.V., S.A., Other Affiliate United Fresh Transports S.A., Other Affiliate United Reefer Services S.A., Other Affiliate West Coast Fresh Farming, Inc., Other Affiliate Associated Santa Maria Minerals, Other Affiliate Compania Bananera La Estrella, S.A., Other Affiliate Compania Bananera Los Laureles, S.A., Other Affiliate Compania Bananera Monte Blanco, S.A., Other Affiliate Fundacion Para El Desarrolo de Comunidades Sostenables en el Valle de Sula, Other Affiliate Hospital La Lima, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Latitude 36 Foods, LLC for Chiquita Brands LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ortega, Victoria)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 391 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and Affirmative Defenses by NL Industries, Inc..(Waterworth, Gregory)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 389 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by NL Industries, Inc. (Waterworth, Gregory) Modified on 3/15/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 388 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cowan Systems, Inc. identifying corporate affiliate Cowan Asset Management, LLC (Gorski, Anthony)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 387 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF #386 MOTION to Dismiss by Cowan Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appx 1-9 in support of Memorandum)(Gorski, Anthony) Modified on 3/15/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cowan Systems, Inc.(Gorski, Anthony)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 385 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Waterworth on behalf of NL Industries, Inc. (Waterworth, Gregory)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by C&I Leasing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1)(Scherr, Jason)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 383 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joel Herz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9154471.) by NL Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Prevas, Thomas)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 382 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. NL Industries, Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 381 MOTION for More Definite Statement Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) by 7-Eleven, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Salaheldin, Maram)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 380 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Eclipse International, Inc. served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by 7-Eleven, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SEJ Asset Management & Investment Company, Corporate Parent Seven & I Holdings Co., Ltd. for 7-Eleven, Inc..(Salaheldin, Maram)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 378 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas K Prevas on behalf of NL Industries, Inc. (Prevas, Thomas)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 377 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #376 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant H&R Block, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/11/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 376 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jotun Paints, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Jotun A/S for Jotun Paints, Inc..(Sher, Joel)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 374 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #372 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Lebanon Seaboard Corporation answer due 3/31/2021.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/11/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J. Parsells (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9152182.) by Lebanon Seaboard Corporation(Carrier, William)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Lebanon Seaboard Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carrier, William)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by C&I Leasing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pepsi-Cola Metropolitan Bottling Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Mid-America Improvement Corporation, Other Affiliate P-Americas, LLC, Other Affiliate Pepsi Bottling Group Global Finance, LLC, Other Affiliate Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Fort Lauderdale-Palm Beach, LLC, Other Affiliate South Properties, Inc., Other Affiliate Whitman Corporation, Other Affiliate Whitman Insurance Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Inmobiliaria Interamericana, S.A. De C.V., Other Affiliate IC Equities, Inc, Other Affiliate Bottling Group Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate The Central America Bottling Corporation for C&I Leasing, Inc..(Scherr, Jason)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 370 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #369 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Holly Poultry, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/10/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 369 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 368 REPLY to Response to Motion re #174 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Truist Financial Corporation.(McIntosh, Carolyn)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 367 RESPONSE in Opposition re #287 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Guthrie, Rachel)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 366 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #365 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Harland Clarke Corp. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/9/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 365 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 364 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. King David at Autumn Lake LLC waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 363 REPLY to Response to Motion re #163 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Armacell, LLC.(Hamilton, David)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 362 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Asarco LLC served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 361 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #360 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/9/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Monday, April 12, 2021 by A&M (2015) LLC(Redway, H)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 359 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #358 Stipulation filed by Holly Poultry, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/8/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 358 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Holly Poultry, Inc.(Simons, Adam)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 357 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #355 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Nationwide Auto Sales Corp. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/8/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 356 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Schumacher & Seiler, Inc. waiver sent on 3/8/2021, answer due 5/7/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 355 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 354 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Waterworth on behalf of The Victory Racing Plate Company (Waterworth, Gregory)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 353 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas K Prevas on behalf of The Victory Racing Plate Company (Prevas, Thomas)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 352 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Waterworth on behalf of Norris Automotive Holdings LLC (Waterworth, Gregory)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 351 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Waterworth on behalf of New Ridge Associates, Inc. (Waterworth, Gregory)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 350 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Waterworth on behalf of Crown Central LLC (Waterworth, Gregory)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 349 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Waterworth on behalf of Alban Tractor Co., Inc. (Waterworth, Gregory)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 348 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #346 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re defendant Lifestar Response Corp. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/5/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 347 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Eby-Brown Company, LLC waiver sent on 2/14/2021, answer due 4/15/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 346 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ANSWER to #185 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, , ANSWER to #185 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by ViacomCBS, Inc..(Johnston, Mark)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 344 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Tektronix, Inc. served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 343 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #342 Stipulation filed by Jotun Paints, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/5/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 342 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jotun Paints, Inc.(Sher, Joel)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David R. Tripp (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9143472.) by Jotun Paints, Inc.(Sher, Joel)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 340 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel I Sher on behalf of Jotun Paints, Inc. (Sher, Joel)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Roper Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc., Corporate Parent Haier US Appliance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Intelligent Appliance (BVI) Investment Limited, Corporate Parent Wonder Global (BVI) Investment Limited, Corporate Parent Haier Shareholdings (Hong Kong) Limited, Corporate Parent Haier Smart Home Co., Ltd for Roper Corporation.(Sullivan, Timothy)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Roper Corporation.(Sullivan, Timothy)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 337 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #336 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/5/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MOTION for Extension of Time by Hilton Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Caroline)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 335 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Susan Schmidt on behalf of Hilton Worldwide, Inc. (Schmidt, Caroline)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 334 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #332 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Brand Industrial Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/4/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 333 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #331 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/4/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint, Unopposed by Caraustar Industries, Inc., Greif, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dimond, Thomas)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 330 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #329 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Givaudan Flavors Corp. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/4/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 328 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. waiver sent on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 327 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #326 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Graybar Electric Company Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/3/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 326 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen E. Fitzgerald (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9139498.) by C&I Leasing, Inc.(Scherr, Jason)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Scherr on behalf of C&I Leasing, Inc. (Scherr, Jason)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 323 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #322 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Heritage Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. answer due 4/15/2021.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/3/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Heritage Chevrolet-Buick, Inc.(Dickinson, Michelle)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #185 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, of Vornado Realty Trust by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ANSWER to #185 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by Chiquita Brands LLC.(Curp, John)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 319 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #318 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Lane Bryant, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/2/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 318 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 317 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Ceres Marine Terminals Inc. served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 316 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Foot Locker Specialty, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 315 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Heritage Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 314 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #313 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #312 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendants Industrial Container Services, LLC and Tri-Star Realty, LLP, Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/1/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 312 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 311 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. CitiFinancial Credit Company served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 310 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Genesco Inc. served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 309 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #307 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Batesville Casket Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/1/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 308 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #306 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Lion Brothers Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/1/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 305 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #304 Stipulation filed by Treehouse Private Brands, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/1/2021. (vals, Chambers)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 304 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Treehouse Private Brands, Inc.(Fundakowski, Claire)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Amanda Fundakowski on behalf of Treehouse Private Brands, Inc. (Fundakowski, Claire)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 302 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Legg Mason, Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 301 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Carisam-Samuel Meisel (MD), Inc. served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 300 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc. served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 299 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Hampshire Industries, Inc. served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 298 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Detroit Royalty, Inc. served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 297 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #296 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant Shell Oil Company. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/25/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 296 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 295 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Poly-Seal LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/5/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 294 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. NCR Corporation served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 293 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Mondelez International, Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pabst Brewing Co. identifying Corporate Parent Pabst Holdings, LLC for Pabst Brewing Co..(Demirjian, Heather)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 291 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Brand Industrial Services, Inc. served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 290 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Aaron's, Inc. served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 289 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #280 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Heather L Demirjian. Directing attorney Heather L Demirjian to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/24/2021. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Deficiency Notice to Defendant Pabst Brewing Co. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 3/3/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Pabst Brewing Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Affidavit of Robert Urband, #3 Affidavit of HC Jones III, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Attachment Certification of Service)(Jones, Harry)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 286 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Jerry's Chevrolet, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 285 RESPONSE in Opposition re #174 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Shaffie, Ambereen)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 284 RESPONSE in Opposition re #163 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by 68th Street Site Work Group.(Guthrie, Rachel)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 283 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #282 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Ascension St. Agnes Hospital. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/23/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 281 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Lebanon Seaboard Corporation served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/5/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Heather L. Demirjian (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9122456.) by Pabst Brewing Co.(Jones, Harry)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 279 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #267 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel McKillop. Directing attorney Daniel McKillop to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/22/2021. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 278 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. The Victory Racing Plate Company served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 277 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Treehouse Private Brands, Inc. served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 276 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. The Rukert Terminals Corporation served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 275 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Premier Technology Inc. served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Melibelle USA, Inc. served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 273 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Lifetouch National School Studios, LLC served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Co. L.P. served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 271 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Kmart Corporation served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 270 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Glen-Gery Corporation served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 269 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Drug City Pharmacy, LLC served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 268 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. A&M (2015) LLC served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel T. McKillop by 68th Street Site Work Group. The fee has already been paid.(Baker, William)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Ridgeway Manor, Inc. served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Koros, LLC served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Caplan Brothers, Inc. served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership waiver sent on 1/19/2021, answer due 3/22/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #259 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendant M. Weinman Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/19/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #229 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lisa Rushton. Directing attorney Lisa Rushton to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #228 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jason C Hicks. Directing attorney Jason C Hicks to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 QC NOTICE: #226 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Vornado Realty Trust needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Russell T. Bundy Associates, Inc. served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Universal Music Group, Inc. served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. HSBC North America Holdings, Inc. served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Bell and Howell, LLC served on 2/15/2021, answer due 3/8/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Zurich American Insurance Company served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/5/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Elg Metals, Inc. served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. US Foods, Inc. served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. American Express Company served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE of Appearance by Maram Salaheldin on behalf of 7-Eleven, Inc. (Salaheldin, Maram)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Stella Maris Operating Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Stella Maris, Inc., Other Affiliate Mercy Health Services, Inc., Other Affiliate The Cardinal Shehan Center, Inc. for Stella Maris Operating Corp..(Dvornicky, Jared)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Stella Maris Operating Corp..(Dvornicky, Jared)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 QC NOTICE: #227 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Chiquita Brands LLC was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file and enter the names of all entities listed on exhibit, into the CM/ECF system when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc. served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Hilton Worldwide, Inc. served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #232 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #241 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #231 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re State Farm Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Co., The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/16/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #230 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Keurig Dr. Pepper, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/12/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (ORIGINALLY FILED 2/12/21) Modified on 2/16/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Burt Rigid Box, Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/5/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Norris Automotive Holdings LLC waiver sent on 1/21/2021, answer due 3/22/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Alban Tractor Co., Inc. waiver sent on 1/21/2021, answer due 3/22/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Airgas, Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/5/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas K Prevas on behalf of Alban Tractor Co., Inc. (Prevas, Thomas)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas K Prevas on behalf of New Ridge Associates, Inc. (Prevas, Thomas)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas K Prevas on behalf of Norris Automotive Holdings LLC (Prevas, Thomas)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas K Prevas on behalf of Crown Central LLC (Prevas, Thomas)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lisa Rushton by Armacell, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Hamilton, David)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jason C. Hicks by Armacell, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Hamilton, David)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Chiquita Brands LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ortega, Victoria) Modified on 2/16/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel T. McKillop by Vornado Realty Trust. The fee has already been paid.(Baker, William)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #217 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John P Curp. Directing attorney John P Curp to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/12/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #216 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Cioffi. Directing attorney Michael Cioffi to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/12/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Penske Logistics LLC waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Industrial Container Services, LLC waiver sent on 1/19/2021, answer due 3/22/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #199 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David Andrew Rockman. Directing attorney David Andrew Rockman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/12/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #194 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Alexander S Valdes. Directing attorney Alexander S Valdes to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/12/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #193 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomas W Dimond. Directing attorney Thomas W Dimond to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/12/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 QC NOTICE: #191 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Vornado Realty Trust needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John P. Curp by Chiquita Brands LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Ortega, Victoria)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael L. Cioffi by Chiquita Brands LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Ortega, Victoria)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 QC NOTICE: #184 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Chiquita Brands LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 QC NOTICE: #183 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Chiquita Brands LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 QC NOTICE: #166 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Armacell, LLC, Armacell United States Holdings LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 QC NOTICE: #165 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Armacell, LLC, Armacell United States Holdings LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #158 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andrew G May. Directing attorney Andrew G May to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/12/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #156 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Collette Alison Woghiren. Directing attorney Collette Alison Woghiren to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/12/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #155 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lisa Zebovitz. Directing attorney Lisa Zebovitz to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/12/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #207 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Roca USA Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/12/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Truist Financial Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Regional Acceptance Corporation, Other Affiliate Truist Bank, Other Affiliate BB&T Securities, LLC, Other Affiliate Boston Services Company, Inc., Other Affiliate GenSpring Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate MBT, Ltd., Other Affiliate ST Management Services (India) Private Limited, Other Affiliate Sterling Capital Management LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust 1031 Exchange Co., Other Affiliate SunTrust Delaware Trust Company, Other Affiliate SunTrust Equity Funding, LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust Insurance Services, Inc., Other Affiliate SunTrust NLIP, Inc, Other Affiliate SunTrust Outsourcing Management, LLC, Other Affiliate SunTrust Personal Loans, Inc, Other Affiliate SunTrust Plaza Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate Truist Advisory Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Truist Investment Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Truist Securities, Inc. for Truist Financial Corporation.(McIntosh, Carolyn)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Howard Leibowitz on behalf of Pabst Brewing Co. (Leibowitz, Gary)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Conrad Jones on behalf of Pabst Brewing Co. (Jones, Harry)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Solo Cup Operating Corporation identifying Corporate Parent KBDRCD Holdings LLC for Solo Cup Operating Corporation.(Fedder, Steven)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Valley Motors, Inc. waiver sent on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 QC NOTICE: #189 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Solo Cup Operating Corporation was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file and enter name of affiliations when prompted into the CM/ECF system. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #200 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/11/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David A. Rockman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9105913.) by ViacomCBS, Inc.(Johnston, Mark)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Vornado Realty Trust identifying Corporate Parent Vornado Realty L.P. for Vornado Realty Trust, Vornado Realty Trust, Vornado Realty Trust.(Baker, William)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Deficiency Notice to Chiquita Brands LLC-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 2/17/2021. Please follow the prompts to add affiliations, if any, into the CM/ECF system. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 QC NOTICE: #175 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Truist Financial Corporation was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file and enter name of affiliate when prompted into the CM/ECF system. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 QC NOTICE re: #185 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, filed by Vornado Realty Trust. **Corporate Disclosure Statement was filed as as attachment(s) to Answer. This must be filed as its own entry using the event "Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement" found in the Category of "Other Documents" and follow the prompts to enter affiliations into the CM/ECF system. The Disclosure Attachments (ONLY) have been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the attachment links to those documents have been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alexander S. Valdes by Caraustar Industries, Inc., Greif, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Rhee, Hansel)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas W. Dimond by Caraustar Industries, Inc., Greif, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Rhee, Hansel)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Len Stoler, Inc. (Simpson, Lacie)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel T. McKillop (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9104034.) by Vornado Realty Trust(Baker, William)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #186 Stipulation filed by Pabst Brewing Co.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/10/2021. (vals, Chambers)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Solo Cup Operating Corporation (Fedder, Steven) Modified on 2/11/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ANSWER to Complaint by Solo Cup Company.(Fedder, Steven)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Len Stoler, Inc..(Simpson, Lacie)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Stipulation of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Pabst Brewing Co.(Jones, Harry)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Vornado Realty Trust's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against 68th Street Site Work Group, COUNTERCLAIM against 68th Street Site Work Group by Vornado Realty Trust. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Disclosure of Corporate Interest, #2 Exhibit Vornado Realty Trust Affiliates)(Baker, William)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John P. Curp (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9103520.) by Chiquita Brands LLC(Ortega, Victoria)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael L. Cioffi (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9103510.) by Chiquita Brands LLC(Ortega, Victoria)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Chiquita Brands LLC.(Ortega, Victoria)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Ortega on behalf of Chiquita Brands LLC (Ortega, Victoria)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #179 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/9/2021. (vals, Chambers)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Stella Maris Operating Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dvornicky, Jared)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Victoria Colonna on behalf of Armacell, LLC (Colonna, Hillary)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 QC NOTICE: #153 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Greif, Inc., Caraustar Industries, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 QC NOTICE: #152 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Greif, Inc., Caraustar Industries, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Truist Financial Corporation (McIntosh, Carolyn) Modified on 2/10/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Truist Financial Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Carolyn)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #170 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Viad Corp. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/9/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by ViacomCBS, Inc..(Johnston, Mark)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ViacomCBS, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS, Inc..(Glajch, Jessica)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Ashley Glajch on behalf of ViacomCBS, Inc. (Glajch, Jessica)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Johnston on behalf of ViacomCBS, Inc. (Johnston, Mark)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #159 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #160 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #161 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendants - Illinois Sleep Products, Inc., Powercon Corporation, and Froehling & Robertson, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/9/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lisa Rushton (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9102219.) by Armacell, LLC(Hamilton, David)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jason C. Hicks (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9102170.) by Armacell, LLC(Hamilton, David)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Armacell, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Armacell United States Holdings LLC for Armacell, LLC.(Hamilton, David)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Armacell, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Hamilton, David)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Hamilton on behalf of Armacell, LLC (Hamilton, David)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew G. May (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9100538.) by Solo Cup Company(Fedder, Steven)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven K Fedder on behalf of Solo Cup Company (Fedder, Steven)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Collette Alison Woghiren (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9100396.) by Solo Cup Company(Fedder, Steven)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lisa S. Zebovitz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9100342.) by Solo Cup Company(Fedder, Steven)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #151 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/8/2021. (vals, Chambers)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alexander S. Valdes (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9098672.) by Caraustar Industries, Inc., Greif, Inc.(Rhee, Hansel)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas W. Dimond (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9098668.) by Caraustar Industries, Inc., Greif, Inc.(Rhee, Hansel)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Caraustar Industries, Inc., Greif, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rhee, Hansel)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Greif, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Caraustar Industries for Greif, Inc. (Rhee, Hansel)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Caraustar Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Greif, Inc. for Caraustar Industries, Inc..(Rhee, Hansel)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Hansel H Rhee on behalf of Caraustar Industries, Inc., Greif, Inc. (Rhee, Hansel)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #145 Stipulation filed by Holly Poultry, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/5/2021. (vals, Chambers)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #144 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/5/2021. (vals, Chambers)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Holly Poultry, Inc.(Simons, Adam)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Lifoam Industries, LLC(Gendron, Andrew)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Prince Minerals, LLC waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Shaffie, Ambereen)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #140 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Ally Financial Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/5/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #139 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/5/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #116 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Alexander Arensberg. Directing attorney Alexander Arensberg to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #112 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Carolyn L McIntosh. Directing attorney Carolyn L McIntosh to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Summons Issued 60 days (as to National Institutes of Health) on U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Correspondence re: Request for Issuance of Summonses (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Merryman, Matthew)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #132 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/3/2021. (vals, Chambers)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #90 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Eric S. Aronson. Directing attorney Eric S. Aronson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Gary)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Singer on behalf of Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC (Singer, Jonathan)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC. Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC waiver sent on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021.(Blumenfeld, Michael)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Evan Blumenfeld on behalf of Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC (Blumenfeld, Michael)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 PAPERLESSORDER re #126 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #125 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #127 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Mawson and Mawson, Inc., USF Redstar LLC, and YRC Worldwide Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/2/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 QC NOTICE re: #120 Correspondence requesting issuance of summons. ** The Summons for Defendant National Institutes of Health has been issued. Pursuant to FRCP 4, when serving the United States and Its Agencies, Corporations, Officers, or Employees, a party must deliver a copy of the summons and complaint to U.S. Attorney and Attorney General. Please file summons for the U.S. Attorney and Attorney General for issuance by the Clerk if applicable. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Summons Issued 60 days as to National Institutes of Health.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Summons Issued 21 days as to A&M (2015) LLC, Airgas, Inc., Alban Tractor Co., Inc., Ally Financial Inc., American Express Company, Asarco LLC, Bell and Howell, LLC, Brand Industrial Services, Inc., Burt Rigid Box, Inc., Caplan Brothers, Inc., Carisam-Samuel Meisel (MD), Inc., Ceres Marine Terminals Inc., CitiFinancial Credit Company, Cloverland Dairy Limited Partnership, Detroit Royalty, Inc., Drug City Pharmacy, LLC, Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Eclipse International, Inc., Elg Metals, Inc., Foot Locker Specialty, Inc., Genesco Inc., Glen-Gery Corporation, HMS Host Family Restaurants, Inc., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Hampshire Industries, Inc., Heritage Chevrolet-Buick, Inc., Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Industrial Container Services, LLC, Jerry's Chevrolet, Inc., Keurig Dr. Pepper, Inc., King David at Autumn Lake LLC, Kmart Corporation, Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Co. L.P., Koros, LLC, Lane Bryant, Inc., Lebanon Seaboard Corporation, Legg Mason, Inc., Lifetouch National School Studios, LLC, Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc., M. Weinman Company, Inc., Melibelle USA, Inc., Mondelez International, Inc., Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC, NCR Corporation, NL Industries, Inc., Nationwide Auto Sales Corp., Norris Automotive Holdings LLC, Penske Logistics LLC, Poly-Seal LLC, Premier Technology Inc., Prince Minerals, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Ridgeway Manor, Inc., Russell T. Bundy Associates, Inc., Schumacher & Seiler, Inc., State Farm Life Insurance Company, Tektronix, Inc., The Rukert Terminals Corporation, The Victory Racing Plate Company, Treehouse Private Brands, Inc., US Foods, Inc., Universal Music Group, Inc., Valley Motors, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #119 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Grauls Market, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/1/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Correspondence re: Request for Issuance of Summonses (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Summons)(Merryman, Matthew)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #115 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #113 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #114 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Abacus Corporation, Amtote International, and Master-Halco, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/1/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company waiver sent on 1/19/2021, answer due 3/22/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alexander Arensberg (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9089616.) by Truist Financial Corporation(Harris, Rachael)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carolyn L. McIntosh (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9089563.) by Truist Financial Corporation(Harris, Rachael)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Abelson Harris on behalf of Truist Financial Corporation (Harris, Rachael)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Unilever United States, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Shaffie, Ambereen)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Bob Bell Automotive Group, Inc. waiver sent on 1/21/2021, answer due 3/22/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #107 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re First National Bank of Pennsylvania and F.N.B. Corporation. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/29/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Benjamin Moore & Co. answer due 3/11/2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/29/2021. (vals, Chambers)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #102 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #104 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #103 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Dayton Superior Corporation, and Hohmann & Barnard, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/29/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Tri-Star Realty, LLP waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Shaffie, Ambereen)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Roca USA Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Shaffie, Ambereen)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Donohoe Real Estate Services waiver sent on 1/21/2021, answer due 3/22/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Benjamin Moore & Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order to Extend Defendant Benjamin Moore & Co.'s Time to move or otherwise respond to the Complaint)(Curley, Seamus)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. American Sugar Refining, Inc. waiver sent on 1/21/2021, answer due 3/22/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #92 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #93 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #94 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #95 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group re Defendants American Premier Underwriters, Inc., Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc., Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, and Laird Plastics, Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/28/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Crown Central LLC waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric S. Aronson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9083234.) by Benjamin Moore & Co.(Curley, Seamus)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Benjamin Moore & Co. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Benjamin Moore & Co..(Curley, Seamus)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Seamus Curley on behalf of Benjamin Moore & Co. (Curley, Seamus)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #86 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Service America Corporation filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/26/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Bob Davidson Ford, Inc. waiver sent on 1/19/2021, answer due 3/22/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #81 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #83 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #80 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group, #82 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by 68th Street Site Work Group; dismissing Defendants Brinks Inc., Quikrete Holdings, Inc., Clark Equipment Company, Albert S. Smyth Co., Inc. and Smyth Jewelers Inc. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/26/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Shell Oil Company waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Illinois Sleep Products, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #75 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant CRW Parts Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/25/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Eagle Group waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Shaffie, Ambereen)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Vornado Realty Trust waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Holly Poultry, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PAPERLESS ORDER #71 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant MacDermid, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/19/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #69 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant McCormick & Company, Inc. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/19/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Len Stoler, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Batesville Casket Company, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #63 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Fuchs Lubricants Co. filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/15/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. New Ridge Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Shaffie, Ambereen)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #62 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Avis Rent a Car System, LLC filed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/15/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 68th Street Site Work Group (Merryman, Matthew)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Quikrete Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Shaffie, Ambereen)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Transamerica Premier Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Pabst Brewing Co. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Shaffie, Ambereen)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. High's of Baltimore, LLC waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Shaffie, Ambereen)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Benjamin Moore & Co. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Shaffie, Ambereen)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. C&I Leasing, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 68th Street Site Work Group. Mawson and Mawson, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021.(Merryman, Matthew)
January 11, 2021