Beasley v. GC Services Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Cynthia Callahan, Clara Loya, Linda E. Starkweather, Mayscree Whittaker, Stephanie Canava, Delania Michelle Vignal, Andrew Frantz, Gary Skelly, Sitra Muhammad, Kenneth Burke, Lendon Harris, Cortney Stephens, Jessica Meraz, Alba Rocio Madrigal, Dionne Alexander, Adrienne S Keeling, Zachary Jordan Hannah, Angela Lashae Marcum, Jessica Bates, Carlos Wyrick, Yolanda Zavala, Vieto M. Larsen, Deteachia Walker, Jesus Medina, Madeline Workman, Arielle Marie Young, Rekisha A. Morgan, Jaytese Danyale Westmoreland, Nicole Braddy, Sandra Barnes, Latanya Brown, Lytisha Campbell, Rochelle Clowers, Monica Rowland, Twyna Rue Wilson, Thelma Dorthalina, Suerina Jones, Sherry Mathis, Mayda Velasquez, Kristi Jenkins, Tiarra Michelle Butler, Andrea Lasha Henderson, Laura Beall, Anthony Harry-Gonzales, Rebecca Dutiel, Yulissa Peguero, Tiffany Cole, Domonique Pugh, Shannon Lyons, Robert Crockrel, Mitchell Popp, D'juana Lynn Peeples, Paula Riley, Jerod L. Mattox, Elizabeth M. Gonzalez, Monique Conerly, John Jackson, Jasmine Smith, Nhu Lam, Angela Meadows, Marlana Marie Holley, Kaelyn Overholser, Trish Laporte, Tammy Van Meter, Igor Kirillovic Kirillin, Robert Cross, Jaclynn Estrada, Connie Nelson, Mari Alvarado, Darrell Diggs, Charla Clere, Stacie Hayford, Charles Drinks, Lyle Adcock, David Olivas, Frederick Brown, II, William S. Bayless, Courtney Eliska Parker, Amoria Wise, Betty Marie Anderson, Shelita Murriel, Jessica Waggoner, Amanda Gaare, April Garza, Lisa Canupp, Teresa Wilson, Alexis Janay Evans, Brittany Spates, Janet Sanders, Brittanie Faith Ulrich, Dena Stooksbury, James Boling, Deanna Figueroa, Felicia Crosby, Brandy Wheatfall, Brock Arnwine, Ronda Webb, Josef Pawlata, Chelsi Jones, Brittney Nashawn Robinson, Zhrain Johnson, Gloria Peoples, Rene Delgado, Michael Stevenson, Bianca Tenille Hodge, Paul Edward Sexton, Jr., Gail Reedy, Monique Young, Brandy Biesecker, Daniel Jones, Shauna Miller, Joseph Thomas McCoy, Samarri L. Powe, Tanja Coleman, Aubri Simonson, Karess Murray, Jessica Pack, Lamanda Reddick, Cynthia Rivera, Donna Cammarato, Dustin Orf, Deondra Mckiver, Irma Guardiola, Shawn Hutcheson, Tracy J. Richard, Maria Luz Barton, Felicia Moore, Wendy Renelique, Loria Bennett, Whitney Hall, Kylie Ryan, Marisol Calleja, Likia Duvall, Patricia Lindley, Marquavius James, Darell Lynn Feggans, Keisha Smith-Bridges, Gregory Dunkle, II, Raveen Martinez, Inga Brown, Ashley Holmes, Karen Burcroff, Jessica Vargas, Esmeralda Acosta, Shavonnda Mcilwain, Elnora Burns, Kevin M. Greer, Monika Saenz, Maria Perez, Mary Clark, Allison Yuckniuk, Amy A. Avila, Crystal Russell, Vondell Vonalaire Jefferson, Brittany Hakes, Aaron Norwood, Jessica Robertson, Mohammad Khan, Candace Schmitke, Maria E. Tapia, Amber Hill, Kathy Hernandez, Sandra Folsom, Ralph Holley, Andrew Hicks, Jr., Thaquila Sharda Marsh, Bernard Wejzgrowicz, Jaime Priego, Jr., Karvaill Ladarreou Cole, Mescal Adkins, James Galey, Shanika Freeman, Reginald Guyton, Johnathan Elijah Pitt, Lindsay Bruce, April Lakey, Tunisha Basenback, Bonnie Sharp, Kristina Ellis, Anna Young, Ramon Sanchez, Jr., Latosha Fuller, Maria Nichole Warren, Marcico Petties, Jimmy Hill, Raquel Ramos, Argraina Kitchens, Michelle Lee Shultz, Cynthia Newell, Jolee Hackworth, Angela Mills, Steven Hohimer, Trisia Taylor, Melissa High, Tameka Jones, Jannie May, Christopher Angel, Marilyn Ruth Dillon, Christina Ann Casteel, Marquetta Harris, Eva Maze, Michael Roberts, Reajon Timmons, John Romkey, Montrelle Washington, Leonard Jones, Christopher Owen Joseph, Tiffany Tiere Gant, Victoria D. McKechnie, Margaret F. Newman, Jasmine Lateace Johnson, Christopher Paul Wild, Heather O'Brate, Niaya Barnes, Amoes George Aaron, Linda Genea Johnson, Ladonna Whitehead, Kyle McCreery, Mary Minkin, Pamela Cook, Raymond Diaz, Brandi Patterson, Joseph Vollmann, Yamyletha White, Thomas Joe Matty, Vickie Blevins, Sarah Marie Hartnett, Misty Workman, Jacqueline Cespedes, Heather Bailey, Rachel Posadas, Michael Twomey, Chantal Robinson, Charles Moore, Hamunyangwa Mumbuluma, Rene Martinez, Deron Cross, Lucerna Y. Barrera, Kevin Omondi Wasonga, Christi Dawn Crockett, Jessica Mayo, Marcella Knight, Theresa Scruton, Delores Calandro, Leslie Douglas Middleton, Neil Bowers, Jessica Lee Curington, Samuel Garton, Jocelyn Johnson, Alex Jackson, Judi King, Tiffany Asbury, Donald Meade, Matthew G. Dotson, Deloris Chadwick, Brittany Smith, Janelle Davis, John Trivilino, Mofoluwasho Oluwaseun Adenekan, Donna Delawder, Joe Singleton, Jacqueline Arwood, Linda Davis, Barbara Munar, Debra Gable, David Montiel, Paula Bowers, Dalila Lugo Cirino, Elizabeth Christine Traylor, Brandon Prudhomme, Melvin Jones, Jr., Magdalena Echevarria, Jamie Thornton, Richard A.O. Bennett, Benny Agosto Lopez, Telieka Rebecca Johnson, Lucas Tucker, Otis Tarkington, Paul Roberson, Shaun W. Copelin, Mercedes Washington, Arthur Grant, Jr., Alicia Valdez, David Koon, Brandi Nicholson, Delita Jean Mullins, Bertha Ann Gutierrez, Chasity Rubiano, Gail Gwendolyn Long, Monique Campbell, Melissa Widener, Jesus Servin, Sharine Blanks, Timfreit Drane, Zakiyyah Qadriyyah Keyes, David Moore, Valerie Smith, Janice Andrews, Imari Hatter, Carla Hawley, Gina Odige, Jonetta Stephens, Phyllis Ann Gonzalez, Gwenda Sue Harr, Quindrea Hooper, Sabrina Williams, David Tracy, Batavia Lee, June Howard, Joanna Spence, Giovanni Jenkins, Maribel Wongwui, Alice Diane Remler, Angela Dawn Sharp, Joan Rios, Patricia Collins, Francisca Bernice Mendoza, Brittany Shae Spurlock, Falon Nicole Henderson, Patricia Mains, Daquiri Price, Emily Smith, Sophia Gonzales, Sultan Shabazz, Tamra Johnson, Andrew Michael Berger, Tovia Gough, Willie Morris, Rosa Anna Munguia, Andrew Michael Martin, Samia Asfour, Diane Price, Katrina Mackey, Roni Michelle Stone, Deidra Maynard, Brittinni Vaugh, Shavon C. Barkins, Kassie N Kepler, Theresa Petrowicz, Jason Cera, Lanette Racheal Hernandez, Summer Bradley, Cobi Silver, Donald Eugene Morris, Lillian Green, Tasha Mayes, Natasha Rone Bates, David Gamble, Regina Harper, Dereika Carrell, Miguel Espana, Covell Hurley, Yvonne C. Richardson, Katrina Bray, Julie Sexton, Melissa A. Lamb, Yolanda Aguilera, Carol Simon, Barbara Campbell, Arlyne Johnson, Daniel Spurlock, Joshua Michael Joyce, Shannon Patrice Malone, Cheri Johnson, Jasmin Granados, Jasmine Selma Harris, Lateisa Peet, Irma Vining, Cecilia Bryant, Jauris A Range, Brenda Geisler, Rosemary Chavez, Renee Washington, Deann Rutkowski, Shamera Summers, Zora Cameron, Angela Wallace, Cory Lewis, Belinda Hernandez, Amanda Farley, Lydia Howard, Jennifer Armenta, Christopher M. Alexander, Marilyn Yazzie, Emily Jo Fowler, Linda Jackson, Lois Kiser, Aaron Reck, Brittany Myers, Janice Gilliam, Brittany Stanley, Estalean Thornton, Linda Donaldson, Laneca Sandifort, Rodney Onque, Stanley V. Brookins, Erik Basarich, Dawn Kennedy, Alice Howard, Keith Cook, Tinika Atkinson, Richelle Nicole Johnson, Darrell Joshua Craig, Sade Davis, Dawn Johnson, David Richards, Matthew Roberts, Deresika Gervontia Beaty, Eugenia M. Woodard, Rosemary Ochoa, Cierra Potter, Shatoya Green, Eartha Braggs, Elnora Albert Walker, Sabra Atkinson, Gabrielle Brown, Sarah Garland, Roxann Baca, Elizabeth Olivares, Mark Lewis, Deontae Rhines, Amanda Mitchell, Adaliz Rodriguez, Sylvia Martinez, Khalia Danzy, Meredith Mccoy, Samantha Scherschel, Raymond Jackson, Cheryl A. Glynn, Elizabeth Sutton, Kim Clarke, Maribel Castello, Tonya Burks, Heather Bourne, Felicia E. Pickett, Cathie Taylor, Jeremy Lee Hunter, Lakeitha Ervin, Donald Allen, II, Hannah Ream, Steven Edmondson, Matthew A Camm, Ebony Duncan, John Lasslett, Sarhonda Lois Thompson, Lupe Meza, Ashley Bolden, Randal Capps, Joe Evelyn Valentine, Cierra Dupree, Jessica Sue Evans, Larry Frye, Roy S. Clagg, Patrick John Mullarky, Fiasili D. Fano, Jennifer Ann Lopez, Luis Sanchez, Michael S. Wirick, Paul Silen, Ryan Morgan-Major, Desiree Yvette Lea Cioci, Dejonae Lashee Cannon, Crystal Adams, Malerie Marie Hernandez, Sonia C. Reyes, Brandon Sentner, Shana Johnston, Angela Veals, Jamie Holmes, Jack Jones, Eileen Papin, Lloyd Lemont Edmonds, Darren Green, Antournett Reed, Bianca Ferriell, Cindy Rekemeyer, Justin Cornish, Shawn Reagan Wilkinson, Shirley Sturtevant, Tameka C. Dooley, Katherine Balderrama, Deanna Newberry, Tanya Johnson, Elizabeth Rainbolt, Charris Mcbride, David Wulf, Johnny Reynolds, Nonnie Aneitra Blount-Cole, Kimberly Kent, Rosella Bailey, Kevin Van Meter, Don A Beeler, Natosha Ellis, Tiffany Tackett, Tammy M. Ware, Gale Garrard, Linda Dotson, Anthony Morton, Cecilia Hernandez, Brandon Allen Walters, Soporro DeShong Burns, Angelique Compton, Savannah Brown, Keneitha Morris, Tammy Marie Schooley, Stephen Betanzos, Jewel Clear, Aushia Thomas, Anita R. Bradley, Ashley B. Granville, Amber Wentz, Matthew Parker, Patricia French, Rosa Elva Santillan, Krystal Sua, Caitlin Cunningham Koether, Nicholas Mcpherson, Lisa Jean Lampkin, Consuelo Chapa, Jessica Allton, Rosa E. Enriquez, Chasity Preston, Michael W. Sears, Courtney Morrison, Vianka Valle, Miriam Dominguez, Nyesha Davis, Kenneth Morris, Jacquline Laster, Debra Steffani, Lorraine Caster, Paul Stambaugh, Jimmy Dale Newton, Travis Allen, Jeanette Aytes, Penny Koontz, Ruth Ann Johnson, Antonio Mariano Almeida, Joshua Cole, Christopher Meddings, Della Gilman, Patrice Carter, Caroline Addinall, Lillian Fryer, Shuroya Barnes, Devon Whelpdale, Brittany Cooper, Brandi Nicole Perdue, Jennifer Shido, Leona Johnson, Nancy Eileen Henn, Lindsay Helms, Ryan Newman, Michael Hunt, Sharia Mustin, Stanyelle M. Miles, Samuria Oladeinde, Kiauna Gilbert, Kitrina Dionne Todd, Rebecca Wilhite, CJ Hall, Brandon Nicoloff, Misty Ansel, Marquis A. Davis, Celeste Rodriguez-Fick, Shannon Atkins, Janice Boatwright, Tammy Lynn Brown, Patricia Hammett, Trista Morgan, Michael Pacheco, Justin Fandetti, Luis Santiago, Jr., James Bowden, Brandy Martin, Alexandria Gayle Smith, Shanise McCanelley, Belinda Fleming, David Mendoza, Jennifer Michel Sturgill, Melvin Reynolds, II, Tamara Flores, Ebony Griffith, Naja Gousby, Kenneth Sharp, Donald Prince, Christopher Allen Lockwood, Charisse King, Eureka Davidson, Tiffany Shelby, James Jenkins, Mike Banda, Monica Lara, Megan Wright, Victoria North, Cynthia Horton, Lisa Richardson, Jeffery Bruce Poppenger, Mary Desautel, Robert Hodges, James Dudley, Clarissa Red, Kayla Kristen Stoos, Erich Siebel, Heather Nicole Kuhl, Zachary Thomas Mobley, Deniece Martin, Melissa Moore, Mona M. Gafare, Charlotte Dianna Lilly, Robert Crawford, Andjuan Macon, Jr., Tia Hammond, Carolina Scorza, Nakesha Linnet Hunt, John Gibson, Valerie Frisby, Deborah Anderson, Maurice Hill, Katland McCreery, Christine Murray, Lajuan Yvette Nolan, Jason Broughton, Carlos Emanuel Vazquez, Jessica Johnson, Ashley Scott, Cathy Hammonds, Qiana Richards, Linsie Kohls, Teri Martin, Elizabeth Walden, Sheila Beller, Michael Skaggs, Sharleen Corns, Matthew Swann, Jasmine Mccullough, Rochelle Cook, Monica Burton, Kristin Picton, Cashara D. Joseph, Anna White, Joseph Corbell, Oscar E. Hinojosa, Candace Smith, Robert Gagnon, Timothy Stuart Scherschel, Bobbie Butler, Regina Fortner, Rachel Roy, Brandi Benjamin, Sophia Vanessa Sisneroz, Jacquelyn Jones, Janice Toles, Jose Alba, Christina Orsbon, Pattie Castleberry, David Loncto, Cecilia Villarreal, Marquita Allen, Fernando Del Toro III, Amber Marie Marcum, Angeleta Phipps, Jane Elkins, Tyesia Brown, Brezette Banks, Mary Napier, Walter Christiansen, Simone Davis, Jorge Lebron, Anthony Marshall, Laquiesha Gordon, Tierra Little, Jasmine Jackson, Chanda Bybee, Lindsey Blayne Cormany, Christopher Lee Flannagan, Tammie Lynette Turner, Pedro Castorena, Ron Smith, Jr., Quanique Waller, Latriesha Boyd, Karina Alvarez, Kenneth Bruder, Krystle Watkins, Lori Jeffries, Nicole Moreno, Shelia Marshall, Eric Kimbrell, Sheila L. Helms, David Delgado, Pamela Harrison, Stefanie Hall, Billie Fain, Daron Boan, Consuela Navarrette, Lisa Ann Hutchinson, Nadia Alaniz, Carla Marie Gonzalez, Andrew Mcguire, Eric Rehmann, Albert Linkous Jr., Lamont Fowler, Charlene Childers, Jennee Antoinette Mckenley-Watt, Gina Perez, Pamela Stephanie Williams, Felix Arenas, Thomas Anglim, Anita Dean, Jaime Tomas Delgado, Ashley Nicole Barnett, Sheila Renee Mccallie, Danielle Singleton, Ieisha R. McCullough, Douglas Forrest, Diane Simmons, Tiara Taylor, Gregory Holley, Crisann Deven Wright, Natasha Pelling, Carolina Melendez, Shena Brock, Tia Smith, Jonathan Thomas, Tracy Hinojosa, Cynthia Barroteran, Quintin Jermaine Ford, Sarah R. Copeland, Carl O'Kelley, Barbara Brooks, Nota Barnes, Glenda Chappell, Alyssa Braunberger, Talisa Pierce, Reuben Cervantes, Ashli Hayford, James Hammerstone, Brandi Nichole Taylor, Jennifer Rogers, Marie Gilbert, Ananias Jerome Ealey, Jesus De Leon, Mark Bach, Krystin Nicely, Catlyn Rizzo, Darlene Brown, Edward Griego, Shelly D. Gregory, Earle Hunter, David Ockert, Peggy Thompson, Pamella Brokenshire, Liliana Lopez, John Mcginnis, Nettie Judd, Ashley Drysdale, Joseph Alessandrini, Camden Blue, Teresa Fairfield, Sharnita Rene Masterman, Luz Gutierrez, Thomas Copley, Luvetro Smith, Allen Erickson, Jacquese LeMoyne West, Julie Ollerhead, Deanna Kidd Becraft, Andrea Ellington, Steven Ketelhut, Alenna Faye Mosley, Joseph Armstrong, Mayra Otero, Reginald Dwayne Clark, Shawn Devin Jackson, Christopher Bennett, Andera Gist, Jasmine Bianeshia Freeman, Justin Burns, Leandria Williams, Nural Taylor, Daniele L. David, Randy Brandenburg, Dawn Vernick, Karen Lois Jackson, Shawn Eric Jeffrey, Danielle Whitney Hay, Carl L. Willis, Vanessa Rybak, Michael V. Minniefield, Favis Knox, Melissa Quinn, Leoran Johnson, Lakisha O'Hara, Robin Brown, Melissa A. Carrier, Troy Lee, Tiffany Thomas, Jonathan Kusiak, Nolita Manning, Keidra Demouchet, Mildred Fultz, Kathy Fullerton, Jennie Fortier, Cynthia Harless, Edward Schiller, Crystal Mcmillian, Tiffany Hulse, Mary Roberson, Cherri Bolen, Nichole Simone Williams Carter, Melody Gilmore, Carolyn Webb, Ricardo Morales, Jr., Decarlo Redding, Anointed Davis, Laranice Kaye Osaro, Ricardo Adrian Flores, Cynthia Diane Acosta, Enrique Camacho, Heather Sheppard, Joyce Fish, Teresa Smoot, Jenyce Dickerson, Mark A Triste, Jamie Young, Patricia Hardison, Amoreena Lynn Capasso, Kimberly Patterson, Jessica Tillman, Tashawna Hall, Ashley L. Little, Shana Johnson, Rachel A. Ellgass, Chanque Mcclellan, Laria Chapman, Kelly Vannatter, Janice Marie Wells, Sarah L. Jones, Geraldine T. Harvey, Darren Brown, Amber Lynn Black, Marquita Savage, Sharon Brasher, Hector Ruiz, Brittany Harrison, Jessica Defelic, Jason Rudd, Amanda Alarcon, Cassandra Brown, Christopher Scott, Bobby Blevins, Armenta Lewis, Charles Michael Booth, Edward Nobles, Claudia Maguregui, Kelly Poindexter, Brenda Copley, Tiffany Star Leubner, Thomas Gallups, Jerome Griffen, David Johnson, Mark A Hunter and Christina Lewis
Defendant: GC Services, L.P., GC Services Corp. and GC Services, LP
Case Number: 4:2009cv01748
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2012 Filing 198 NOTICE Withdrawal of Opt-In Consent: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Paul, Richard)
October 12, 2011 Filing 197 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' unopposed motion for approval of settlement [#193] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice as agreed in the settlement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for leave to file in excess of the page limitation [#192] is granted. #192 #193 Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 10/4/2011. (CBL)
September 28, 2011 Filing 195 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
September 28, 2011 Filing 194 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #193 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of FLSA Collective Action Settlement Filed Under Seal filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Potashnick)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
September 28, 2011 Filing 193 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of FLSA Collective Action Settlement Filed Under Seal by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
September 28, 2011 Filing 192 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (Potashnick, Mark)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 191. Sent to non electronic parties this date. Wed Sep 28 08:26:30 CDT 2011 (Porter, Brittany)
September 27, 2011 Filing 191 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #189 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Approval of Settlement ;Proposed extension date 9/29/11: ORDERED GRANTED; #190 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Settlement Documents) ; ORDERED GRANTED only to the extent that parties may file the document under seal on 9/29/11, but Court will consider whether it should remain sealed when it considers whether to approve the settlement. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 09/27/11. (CDP)
September 27, 2011 Filing 190 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Settlement Documents) by Defendant GC Services, LP. (Lisitzky, Sharon)
September 26, 2011 Filing 189 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Motion for Approval of Parties' FLSA Collective Action Settlement ;Proposed extension date 9/29/11 by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (Potashnick, Mark)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 188. Mailed to parties not electronically notified Wed Sep 7 08:25:36 CDT 2011 (Shirley, Kelley)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than September 26, 2011, the parties shall file any motions and proposed Orders for the Courts consideration regarding the final disposition of this matter. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 9/7/11. (KJS)
August 4, 2011 Filing 187 NOTICE of Settlement by Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 20, 2011 Filing 186 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 16, 2011 Filing 185 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 15, 2011 Filing 184 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 14, 2011 Filing 183 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 13, 2011 Filing 182 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 9, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 7, 2011 Filing 180 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 6, 2011 Filing 179 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 3, 2011 Filing 178 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 2, 2011 Filing 177 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiff: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 1, 2011 Filing 176 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 31, 2011 Filing 175 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 27, 2011 Filing 174 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 26, 2011 Filing 173 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 25, 2011 Filing 172 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 24, 2011 Filing 171 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 23, 2011 Filing 170 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 19, 2011 Filing 169 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 18, 2011 Filing 168 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 18, 2011 Filing 167 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 16, 2011 Filing 166 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 13, 2011 Filing 165 NOTICE Consent Filing to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 12, 2011 Filing 164 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 11, 2011 Filing 163 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 10, 2011 Filing 162 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 9, 2011 Filing 161 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 6, 2011 Filing 160 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 4, 2011 Filing 159 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 3, 2011 Filing 158 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 2, 2011 Filing 157 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 29, 2011 Filing 156 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 28, 2011 Filing 155 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 27, 2011 Filing 154 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 26, 2011 Filing 153 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 25, 2011 Filing 152 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 22, 2011 Filing 151 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 21, 2011 Filing 150 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 20, 2011 Filing 149 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 19, 2011 Filing 148 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 18, 2011 Filing 147 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 15, 2011 Filing 146 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 14, 2011 Filing 145 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 13, 2011 Filing 144 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 12, 2011 Filing 143 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 11, 2011 Filing 142 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 8, 2011 Filing 141 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 7, 2011 Filing 140 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 6, 2011 Filing 139 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 5, 2011 Filing 138 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 4, 2011 Filing 137 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 136. Mon Apr 4 07:36:16 CDT 2011 (Hisaw, Kari)
April 4, 2011 Filing 136 Docket Text ORDER re: #134 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney; attorney/firm SEYFARTH SHAW LLP by Defendant GC Services, L.P. ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 4/4/11. (KLH)
April 1, 2011 Filing 135 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 1, 2011 Filing 134 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm SEYFARTH SHAW LLP by Defendant GC Services, L.P.. (Rooney, Arthur)
March 31, 2011 Filing 133 ENTRY of Appearance by Sharon A. Lisitzky for Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (Lisitzky, Sharon)
March 31, 2011 Filing 132 ENTRY of Appearance by Anne Marie Estevez for Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (Estevez, Anne Marie)
March 31, 2011 Filing 131 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 30, 2011 Filing 130 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 29, 2011 Filing 129 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 28, 2011 Filing 128 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 25, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE Consent Filings to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 24, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 22, 2011 Filing 125 NOTICE Consent Filings to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 124. copy of Amended Case Management Order #124 mailed this date to all non electronic parties Tue Mar 22 13:16:30 CDT 2011 (Kost, Mary)
March 22, 2011 Filing 124 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case management order previously entered is amended only as follows, and the amended schedule may not be modified absent a showing of exceptional circumstances:( Discovery Completion due by 10/14/2011., Dispositive Motions due by 11/9/2011., Jury Trial set for 3/12/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14S before Honorable Catherine D. Perry., Pretrial Compliance due by 3/21/2012., Motion in Limine due by 3/2/2012.)( see Order for all deadlines ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motions for leave to appear pro hac vice [#119 and #121] are granted. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on March 22, 2011. (MGK)
March 22, 2011 Filing 123 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 21, 2011 Filing 122 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 21, 2011 Filing 121 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sharon Ann Lisitzky (Filing fee $100) by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (MGK)
March 21, 2011 Filing 120 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 18, 2011 Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anne Marie Estevez (Filing fee $100) by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (MGK)
March 18, 2011 Receipt 4644020477 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Sharon Nee Lisitzky (CCAM)
March 18, 2011 Receipt 4644020477 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Anne Marie Estevez (CCAM)
March 18, 2011 Filing 118 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. Joint Proposed Amended Case Management Plan. (Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 18, 2011 Filing 117 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 17, 2011 Filing 116 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 16, 2011 Filing 115 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 15, 2011 Filing 114 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become a Party Plaintiff: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 15, 2011 Filing 113 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become a Party Plaintiff: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 14, 2011 Filing 112 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 10, 2011 Filing 111 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 110. sent to parties not set up for electronic notification Tue Mar 8 11:23:51 CST 2011 (Scheele, Kara)
March 8, 2011 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for reconsideration [#91] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed amended case management order by no later than March 18, 2011. ( Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/18/2011.) Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 3/8/2011. (KMS)
February 15, 2011 Filing 109 ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT by Neutral: Joan S. Morrow. Date of Conference: February 2, 2011. The parties participated in good faith. The parties did not achieve a settlement. (MCB)
February 15, 2011 ***REMARK--Perry Kitts added as party plaintiff (MGK)
February 14, 2011 Filing 108 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
January 11, 2011 Filing 107 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
January 6, 2011 Filing 106 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 105. Tue Jan 4 15:06:56 CST 2011 (Hisaw, Kari)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint motion to stay all discovery, deadlines, and activity until February 11, 2011 [#104 ] is granted. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 1/4/11. (KLH)
January 3, 2011 Filing 104 Second MOTION to Stay all Discovery, Deadlines, and Activity by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (Schwarz, Ashlea)
December 23, 2010 Filing 103 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
December 22, 2010 ***REMARK - Party Lynn Boling, plaintiff added. (MGK)
December 21, 2010 Filing 102 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
December 10, 2010 Filing 101 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
November 22, 2010 Filing 100 NOTICE by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers of Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
November 2, 2010 Filing 99 SUPPLEMENTAL re #91 MOTION for Reconsideration re #85 Memorandum & Order,,,, by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ingraham v. Dixon Ambulance District)(Potashnick, Mark)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 98. copy of Docket Text Order 98 mailed this date to non electronic party Mon Nov 1 11:11:11 CDT 2010 (Kost, Mary)
November 1, 2010 Filing 98 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #96 Joint MOTION to Stay all discovery, deadlines, and activity by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. ; ORDERED GRANTED Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 11/01/2010. (MGK)
October 29, 2010 Filing 97 REPLY to Response to Motion re #91 MOTION for Reconsideration re #85 Memorandum & Order,,,, filed by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (Rooney, Arthur)
October 29, 2010 Filing 96 Joint MOTION to Stay all discovery, deadlines, and activity by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (Rooney, Arthur)
October 22, 2010 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #91 MOTION for Reconsideration re #85 Memorandum & Order,,,, filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Kurtzeborn v. Allied Gear & Mach. Co., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Erika Beasley Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Debra Davis Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Michael Hunt Declaration)(Potashnick, Mark)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 94. Sent to non-electronic parties. Thu Oct 21 10:04:32 CDT 2010 (Douglas, Ronald)
October 20, 2010 Filing 94 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #93 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kara L. Goodwin ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 10/20/10. (CDP)
October 19, 2010 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kara L. Goodwin (Filing fee $100) by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (KLH)
October 19, 2010 Receipt 4644017412 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Kara L. Goodwin (CCAM)
October 19, 2010 Filing 92 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
October 15, 2010 Filing 91 MOTION for Reconsideration re #85 Memorandum & Order,,,, by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (Rooney, Arthur)
October 14, 2010 Filing 90 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 89. Sent to non-electronic party. Tue Oct 12 14:38:33 CDT 2010 (Douglas, Ronald)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the referral of this case to alternativedispute resolution will terminate on April 30, 2011. (ADR Completion Deadline due by 4/30/2011.) Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 10/12/2010. (RJD)
October 7, 2010 Filing 88 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
October 6, 2010 Filing 87 SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Eric Rehmann re: #35 Motion to Certify Class by Plaintiff Darryl Easley. (KLH)
October 6, 2010 Filing 86 SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Michael Hunt re: #35 Motion to Certify Class by Plaintiff Darryl Easley. (KLH)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 85. Wed Oct 6 10:22:51 CDT 2010 (Hisaw, Kari)
October 6, 2010 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for order conditionally certifying collective action [#35 ] is granted, and the Court conditionally certifies a class of all current and former employees of defendant GC Services, L.P. who have staffed dedicated telephone lines at GC Services call centers in the United States, excluding California, for a period of three (3) years from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall provide plaintiffs' attorneys with a computer-readable data file containing the names, call center locations, and last known addresses of all potential class members on or before October 26, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs may send out a notice consistent with Exhibit 27 to their memorandum in support of their motion for conditional certification, and defendant shall be required to conspicuously post the notice in the break rooms at its call centers, excluding California, until the opt-in period expires. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for leave to supplement [#74 ] is granted. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 10/6/10. (KLH)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: . 83 Tue Sep 28 09:00:51 CDT 2010 (Hisaw, Kari)
September 27, 2010 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral Neutral name: Joan Morrow Neutral selected by Parties (Notice to neutral by mail) (LSD)
September 27, 2010 Filing 83 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #82 Joint MOTION for Leave to Designate Mediator not on Court's Approved List; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 09/27/10. (CDP)
September 23, 2010 Filing 82 Joint MOTION for Leave to Designate Mediator not on Court's Approved List by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (Schwarz, Ashlea)
September 21, 2010 Filing 81 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers Neutral: Joan Morrow Date of Conference: October 25, 2010 time: 9:00 AM Location: Williamsburg, Virginia(Paul, Richard)
September 20, 2010 Filing 80 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
September 13, 2010 Filing 79 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
September 7, 2010 Filing 78 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
September 7, 2010 Filing 77 NOTICE Supplemental Authority: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers re #35 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Paul, Richard)
September 7, 2010 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #35 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Richard)
August 23, 2010 Filing 75 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
August 10, 2010 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to [SUPPLEMENT MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL COLLECTIVE ACTION CERTIFICATION WITH NEW DECLARATIONS] by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhbit 1 - Declaration of Michael Hunt, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Eric Rehmann)(Potashnick, Mark)
August 6, 2010 Filing 73 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
July 30, 2010 Filing 72 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
July 27, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers re #70 Notice (Other) Amended Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Schwarz, Ashlea)
July 22, 2010 Filing 70 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
July 20, 2010 Filing 69 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
July 20, 2010 Filing 68 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
July 13, 2010 Filing 67 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
July 13, 2010 Filing 66 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 23, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
June 23, 2010 Filing 64 NOTICE Supplemental Authority: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers re #35 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Marshall vs. Amsted Industries, Inc.)(Potashnick, Mark)
June 17, 2010 Filing 63 SURREPLY to Motion re #35 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rooney, Arthur)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 62. Copy of Docket Text Order 62 mailed this date to non electronic parties Mon Jun 14 08:48:26 CDT 2010 (Kost, Mary)
June 11, 2010 Filing 62 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #60 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply : ORDERED GRANTED, any surreply must be filed no later than June 17, 2010; #61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Angela J. Mason : ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 06/11/10. (CDP)
June 10, 2010 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Angela J. Mason (Filing fee $100) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (KLH)
June 10, 2010 Receipt 4644014940 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Angela J. Mason (CCAM)
June 10, 2010 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply or Oral Argument by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (Rooney, Arthur)
June 3, 2010 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #35 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28, #2 Exhibit 29, #3 Exhibit 30, #4 Exhibit 31, #5 Exhibit 32)(Paul, Richard)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 58. Sent to non-electronic parties. Tue Jun 1 09:24:37 CDT 2010 (Douglas, Ronald)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 57. Sent to non-electronic parties. Tue Jun 1 09:24:00 CDT 2010 (Douglas, Ronald)
June 1, 2010 Filing 58 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice J. Farrest Taylor, #56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Karol Locascio Fleming, and #55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph David Lane filed by Lora Meyers and Erika Beasey; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 6/1/2010. (RJD)
June 1, 2010 Filing 57 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #52 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Lora Meyers and Erika Beasey; ORDERED GRANTED. (Deadline is June 3, 2010.) Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 6/1/2010. (RJD)
May 28, 2010 Receipt 4644014661 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Karol L Fleming (CCAM)
May 28, 2010 Receipt 4644014660 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Joseph D Lane (CCAM)
May 28, 2010 Receipt 4644014658 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of J Farrest Taylor (CCAM)
May 28, 2010 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Karol Locascio Fleming (Filing fee $100) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (MCB)
May 28, 2010 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph David Lane (Filing fee $100) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (MCB)
May 28, 2010 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice J. Farrest Taylor (Filing fee $100) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (MCB)
May 28, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 27, 2010 Filing 52 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (Paul, Richard)
May 25, 2010 Filing 51 NOTICE by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers of Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 50. Protective Order mailed to non electronic parties Wed May 19 07:54:06 CDT 2010 (Kost, Mary)
May 18, 2010 Filing 50 PROTECTIVE ORDER re: #46 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Lora Meyers, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Erika Beasey Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on May 18, 2010. (MGK)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: . 49 Tue May 18 08:42:17 CDT 2010 (Hisaw, Kari)
May 18, 2010 Filing 49 Docket Text ORDER GRANTING #47 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 5/18/10. (KLH)
May 17, 2010 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Rooney, Arthur)
May 17, 2010 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (Rooney, Arthur)
May 17, 2010 Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Richard)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: . Mon May 17 08:19:56 CDT 2010 (Hisaw, Kari)
May 14, 2010 Filing 45 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice G. Patrick Jacobs: ORDERED GRANTED; #44 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification : ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 05/14/10. (CDP)
May 13, 2010 Receipt 4644014437 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of G. Patrick Jacobs (CCAM)
May 13, 2010 Filing 44 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification by Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (Finkel, Noah)
May 13, 2010 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice G. Patrick Jacobs (Filing fee $100) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey and Lora Meyers. (RJD)
May 10, 2010 Filing 42 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint, by GC Services Limited Partnership.(Rooney, Arthur)
May 4, 2010 Filing 41 NOTICE Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiffs Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 26, 2010 Filing 40 AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT with Exhibits A and B attached against defendant GC Services Limited Partnership,Terminating Darryl Easley and GC Services Corp. Amendment to #1 Complaint, filed by Erika Beasey, Lora Meyers. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Darryl Easley, GC Services Corp.(MCB)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to consolidate and to file a consolidated amended complaint [#30] is GRANTED. The amended complaint [#30] is deemed filed today in the earlier filed case, now captioned Erika Beasley, et al., v. GC Services, L.P., 4:09CV1748 CDP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Lora Meyers, et al., v. GC Services, L.P., et al., No. 4:10CV468 CDP is administratively closed. The parties are directed to file all future filings for the consolidated cases in 4:09CV1748 CDP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion for conditional certification [#38] is GRANTED. Defendant will have until May 14, 2010 to file its response.Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on April 26, 2010. (MCB)
April 23, 2010 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension #35 MOTION to Certify Class, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION to Certify Class Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification by Defendants GC Services Corp., GC Services Limited Partnership. (Finkel, Noah)
April 20, 2010 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and For Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof Consolidate with higher case number 4:10-cv-468 Response to Plaintiffs' Combined Motion to Consolidate Cases and for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Defendants GC Services Corp., GC Services Limited Partnership. (Finkel, Noah)
April 16, 2010 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #35 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Darryl Easley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27)(Paul, Richard)
April 16, 2010 Filing 35 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Darryl Easley. (Paul, Richard)
April 15, 2010 Filing 34 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Plaintiff Darryl Easley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 13, 2010 Filing 33 NOTICE of Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Plaintiff Darryl Easley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 9, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Plaintiff Darryl Easley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 7, 2010 Filing 31 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Plaintiff Darryl Easley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
April 7, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and For Leave to File Amended Consolidated Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof Consolidate with higher case number 4:10-cv-468 by Plaintiff Darryl Easley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Consolidated Complaint)(Paul, Richard)
April 7, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Plaintiff Darryl Easley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 19, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Plaintiff Darryl Easley (Kimberly Holbrook) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 18, 2010 Filing 27 NOTICE Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs: by Plaintiff Darryl Easley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwarz, Ashlea)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Richard Paul ADR Completion Deadline due by 11/1/2010. Designation of Neutral due by 9/21/2010. ADR Conference Schedule due by 9/21/2010. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on March 1, 2010. (MGK)
March 1, 2010 Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 3 (Complex) Motion to Join Parties due by 4/7/2010. Discovery Completion due by 1/17/2011. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 1/28/2011. ADR Future Reference 9/1/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 2/16/2011. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14S before Honorable Catherine D. Perry. Pretrial Compliance due by 8/23/2011. Motion in Limine due by 9/2/2011. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on March 1, 2010. (MGK)
February 26, 2010 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Catherine D. Perry: Rule 16 Conference held in chambers on 2/26/2010. Conference held in person. CMO to issue. (Notice only, no.pdf attached.). (Court Reporter or FTR Gold Operator initials:none.) (FTR Gold yes or no: no.) (DLB)
February 19, 2010 Filing 23 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Darryl Easley.. (Paul, Richard)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 16 Conference reset for 2/26/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14S before Honorable Catherine D. Perry. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the conference pursuant to Rule 16, Fed.R.Civ.P., is reset to Friday, February 26, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. in my chambers. The joint proposed scheduling plan is due no later than February 19, 2010. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 1/5/2010. (RJD)
January 4, 2010 Filing 21 CJRA ORDER (jgw). Judge Magistrate Judge Mary Ann L. Medler termed. Case reassigned to Judge Honorable Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings. In all future documents filed with the Court, please use the following case number 4:09CV1748 CDP. (ARL)
December 11, 2009 Filing 20 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2; Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/30/2009. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/6/2010 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Mary Ann L. Medler. Magistrate Consent due by 12/30/2009.Signed by Magistrate Mary Ann L. Medler on 12/11/09. (Please note this replaces previously sent Rule 16 Order.) (ARL)
December 11, 2009 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Noah A. Finkel for Defendants GC Services Limited Partnership, GC Services Corp.. (Finkel, Noah)
December 9, 2009 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GC Services Limited Partnership.(Rooney, Arthur)
December 9, 2009 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Arthur J. Rooney for Defendant GC Services Limited Partnership. (Rooney, Arthur)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Noah A. Finkel; granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Arthur J. Rooney: Ordered: Both motions GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Ann L. Medler on 12/3/09. (MLM)
December 1, 2009 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Arthur Rooney (Filing fee $100) by Defendants GC Services Limited Partnership, GC Services Corp.. (LGK)
December 1, 2009 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Noah Finkel (Filing fee $100) by Defendants GC Services Limited Partnership, GC Services Corp.. (LGK)
December 1, 2009 Receipt 4644011202 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Arthur J. Rooney (CCAM)
December 1, 2009 Receipt 4644011201 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Noah A. Finkel (CCAM)
November 18, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE Consent to Join FLSA Collective Action: by Plaintiff Darryl Easley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join FLSA Collective Action)(Potashnick, Mark)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Tue Nov 17 09:14:36 CST 2009 (Kresko, Lisa)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ashlea G. Schwarz; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard M. Paul III: Ordered: Both Motions GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Ann L. Medler on 11/16/09. (MLM)
November 12, 2009 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard M. Paul, III (Filing fee $100) by Plaintiff Darryl Easley. (LAH, )
November 12, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ashlea G. Schwarz (Filing fee $100) by Plaintiff Darryl Easley. (LAH, )
November 12, 2009 Receipt 4644010912 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Ashlea G. Schwarz (CCAM)
November 12, 2009 Receipt 4644010911 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Richard M. Paul III (CCAM)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Ordered: GRANTED; Answer or other responsive pleading due by 12/9/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Ann L. Medler on 11/12/09. (MLM)
November 11, 2009 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Darryl Easley. GC Services Corp. served on 10/21/2009, answer due 11/10/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons to Defendant GC Services Corp.)(Potashnick, Mark)
November 11, 2009 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Darryl Easley. GC Services Limited Partnership served on 10/21/2009, answer due 11/10/2009. (Potashnick, Mark)
November 10, 2009 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer C. Znosko for Defendants GC Services Limited Partnership, GC Services Corp.. (Znosko, Jennifer)
November 10, 2009 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants GC Services Limited Partnership, GC Services Corp.. (Neuner, Francis)
November 10, 2009 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Francis X. Neuner, Jr for Defendants GC Services Limited Partnership, GC Services Corp.. (Neuner, Francis)
November 7, 2009 Filing 3 NOTICE Consent to Join FLSA Action: by Plaintiff Darryl Easley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join FLSA Action)(Potashnick, Mark)
October 21, 2009 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. 636 and 18 U.S.C 3401. (CSAW)
October 21, 2009 Case Opening Notification: Summons issued - 2 at 20 days; e-mailed to plaintiff's counsel. Consents issued to all parties. Disclosure of Corporate Interest issued to GC Services Corp.. Judge Assigned: Hon. Mary Ann L. Medler, U.S. Magistrate Judge. (DLB)
October 20, 2009 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Darryl M Easley Process Server: Frederick Investigations, Inc. (Potashnick, Mark)
October 20, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant GC Services Corp., GC Services Limited Partnership with receipt number 08650000000002024414, in the amount of $350 Jury Demand,, filed by GC Services Corp., Darryl M Easley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons to GC Services Corp, #4 Exhibit Summons to GC Services Limited Partnership)(Potashnick, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2009: #5 Exhibit Consent -Join lawsuit) (DLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. GC Services Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Callahan
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Loya
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda E. Starkweather
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayscree Whittaker
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Canava
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delania Michelle Vignal
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Frantz
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Skelly
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sitra Muhammad
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Burke
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lendon Harris
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortney Stephens
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Meraz
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alba Rocio Madrigal
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionne Alexander
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne S Keeling
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Jordan Hannah
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Lashae Marcum
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Bates
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Wyrick
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Zavala
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vieto M. Larsen
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deteachia Walker
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Medina
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Workman
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arielle Marie Young
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rekisha A. Morgan
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaytese Danyale Westmoreland
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Braddy
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Barnes
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latanya Brown
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lytisha Campbell
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Clowers
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Rowland
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twyna Rue Wilson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Dorthalina
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suerina Jones
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Mathis
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayda Velasquez
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Jenkins
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiarra Michelle Butler
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Lasha Henderson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Beall
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Harry-Gonzales
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Dutiel
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yulissa Peguero
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Cole
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domonique Pugh
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Lyons
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Crockrel
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Popp
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'juana Lynn Peeples
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Riley
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerod L. Mattox
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth M. Gonzalez
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Conerly
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Jackson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Smith
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nhu Lam
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Meadows
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlana Marie Holley
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaelyn Overholser
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trish Laporte
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Van Meter
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igor Kirillovic Kirillin
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cross
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaclynn Estrada
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Nelson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mari Alvarado
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Diggs
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charla Clere
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacie Hayford
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Drinks
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle Adcock
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Olivas
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Brown, II
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William S. Bayless
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Eliska Parker
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amoria Wise
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Marie Anderson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelita Murriel
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Waggoner
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Gaare
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Garza
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Canupp
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Wilson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Janay Evans
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Spates
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Sanders
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittanie Faith Ulrich
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dena Stooksbury
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Boling
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Figueroa
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Crosby
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Wheatfall
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock Arnwine
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Webb
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josef Pawlata
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsi Jones
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Nashawn Robinson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhrain Johnson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Peoples
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Delgado
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stevenson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Tenille Hodge
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Edward Sexton, Jr.
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Reedy
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Young
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Biesecker
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jones
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shauna Miller
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thomas McCoy
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samarri L. Powe
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanja Coleman
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubri Simonson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karess Murray
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Pack
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamanda Reddick
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Rivera
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Cammarato
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Orf
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deondra Mckiver
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Guardiola
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Hutcheson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy J. Richard
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Luz Barton
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Moore
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Renelique
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loria Bennett
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Hall
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylie Ryan
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Calleja
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Likia Duvall
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Lindley
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquavius James
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darell Lynn Feggans
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha Smith-Bridges
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Dunkle, II
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raveen Martinez
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inga Brown
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Holmes
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Burcroff
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Vargas
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esmeralda Acosta
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shavonnda Mcilwain
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elnora Burns
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin M. Greer
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monika Saenz
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Perez
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Clark
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Yuckniuk
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy A. Avila
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Russell
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vondell Vonalaire Jefferson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Hakes
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Norwood
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Robertson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Khan
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Schmitke
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria E. Tapia
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Hill
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Hernandez
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Folsom
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Holley
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hicks, Jr.
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaquila Sharda Marsh
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Wejzgrowicz
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Priego, Jr.
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karvaill Ladarreou Cole
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mescal Adkins
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Galey
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanika Freeman
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Guyton
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Elijah Pitt
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Bruce
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Lakey
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tunisha Basenback
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Sharp
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Ellis
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Young
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Sanchez, Jr.
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latosha Fuller
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Nichole Warren
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcico Petties
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Hill
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Ramos
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argraina Kitchens
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Lee Shultz
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Newell
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolee Hackworth
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Mills
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hohimer
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisia Taylor
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa High
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tameka Jones
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannie May
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Angel
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Ruth Dillon
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Ann Casteel
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquetta Harris
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Maze
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Roberts
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reajon Timmons
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Romkey
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montrelle Washington
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Jones
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Owen Joseph
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Tiere Gant
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria D. McKechnie
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret F. Newman
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Lateace Johnson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Paul Wild
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather O'Brate
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niaya Barnes
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amoes George Aaron
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Genea Johnson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladonna Whitehead
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle McCreery
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Minkin
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Cook
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Diaz
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Vollmann
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yamyletha White
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Joe Matty
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Blevins
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Marie Hartnett
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Workman
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Cespedes
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Bailey
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Posadas
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Twomey
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantal Robinson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Moore
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamunyangwa Mumbuluma
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Martinez
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deron Cross
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucerna Y. Barrera
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Omondi Wasonga
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi Dawn Crockett
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Mayo
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Knight
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Scruton
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Calandro
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Douglas Middleton
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Bowers
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lee Curington
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Garton
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Johnson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Jackson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judi King
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Asbury
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Meade
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew G. Dotson
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloris Chadwick
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Smith
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle Davis
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Trivilino
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mofoluwasho Oluwaseun Adenekan
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Delawder
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Singleton
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Arwood
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Davis
Represented By: Ashlea G. Schwarz
Search News [