John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20 et al v. State of Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K and John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36
Defendant: Millard Gustafson, State of Nebraska, Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Col. Bryan Tuma, Donna Fegler Daiss, Michael Long, Richard Roberts, James L. Zimmerman, Glenn Clark, John Morgan, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, Ashley Boettcher, David M. Streich, Shawn R. Eatherton, Daniel A. Smith, Julie L. Reiter, Nathan Cox, George L. Hirschbach, Arlan G. Wine, Eric Scott, Paul B. Schaub, Ted S. Griess, Francis D. Botelho, Thomas B. Donner, Tami Schendt, Kim W. Watson, Vance Haug, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Douglas D. Palik, Leland K. Miner, Paul J. Vaughan, Donald W. Kleine, James D. Owens, Jill R. Cunningham, Patrick A. Duncan, Jon S. Schroeder, Tom Patterson, Randall Ritnour, Philip E. Pierce, Dale Crandall, Todd D. Wilson, A. James Moravek, James Swanson, Mark Young, Michael H. Powell, Bryan S. McQuay, Joel W. Phillips, D. Eugene Garner, Thomas P. Herzog, George G. Vinton, David T. Schroeder, Linda A. Bauer, Julie Smith Hogancamp, David G. Wondra, Blake Edwards, David L. Wilson, John Thomas, Gary Lacey, Rebecca R. Harling, Steve Vinton, Jason White, Joseph M. Smith, Tim Brouillette, Steven M. Curry, Jean Rhodes, Rodney Wetovick, Louie M. Ligouri, Timothy S. Schmidt, David J. Partsch, Victor Faesser, Richard H. Roberts, Timothy E. Hoeft, Verlyn Luebbe, Sandra J. Allen, Ronald E. Colling, Paul Wood, Douglas E. Merz, Avery L. Gurnsey, Tad D. Eickman, Lee Polikov, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Tiffany Wasserburger, Wendy L. Elston, Dennis King, Mark L. Eurek, J. Adam Edmund, W. Bert Lammli, Daniel L. Werner, Warren R. Arganbright, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Shurie R. Graeve, Michael E. Pieper, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Tim Sieh, Greg Magee, Darrell Hamilton, Bill Simpson, K. Patrick Mooney, Tim Sierks, David Spiegel, Tammy Mowry, David Derickson, Steve Hapner, Neil A. Miller, Robert Pickell, Mark Hecker, William Brueggman, Larry Koranda, Timothy Sutherland, Melvin Christensen, Darrell Johnson, Jeff Franklin, Paul J. Kruse, Bradley Boyum, Ted Henderson, James L. Wagner, Karl Dailey, Gary Reiber, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, Dean Chase, Steve Hespen, Timothy F. Dunning, Robert S. McBride, William Burgess, Jerry L. Archer, Daniel Rupp, Kurt Kapperman, Gus, Doug Miller, Larry D. Donner, Dennis Ocken, Shawn Hebbert, David C. Weeks, Jerry Watson, Kirk W. Handrup, Chris Becker, Thomas Dow, Bryan Leggott, Ben Matchett, Lynn Nichols, Harold Schenck, Nels Sorensen, James P. Wenzl, Scott K. White, Kevin Mueller, Jeff Kirsch, Harry J. Gillway, James F. Janecek, Terry Wagner, Jerome Kramer, Patrick McNeil, Kirby Holloway, Vern Hjorth, John Haller, Anthony McPhillips, John Edens, Davis Moore, Brent Lottman, James R. Marr, James Gress, Jayme Reed, James D. Brueggman, Tom Nutt, Rick Eberhardt, John Zavadil, Dwaine W. Ladwig, Gene Mahon, Vernon Buckminster, Willis Haynes, Alan Moore, Jeff Davis, Kevin Stukenholtz, Jim K. Lawson, Joe Yocum, Terry Robbins, Michael F. Janulewicz, William Roe, Michael Unger, David Lee, Gary Eng, Chris Kleinberg, Casey D. Hurlburt, Michael Robinson, LeRoy W. Janssen, Troy Schmitz, Adrian Lindsey, Dale Radcliff, Thomas K. Casady, Alex Hayes, Leonard Houloose, Timothy S. Mullen, Lester E. Johnson, Ron Murtaugh, William Gumm and Donald Klug
Interested Party: Senator Pete Pirsch, Dave Cookson, John Freudenberg, Corey O'Brien, Senator Scott Lautenbaugh and Senator John Harms
Intervenor: John Doe 21-23
Case Number: 8:2009cv00456
Filed: December 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Constitutional - State Statute Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER granting the Plaintiff's #543 Motion for Release of Funds and the Clerk is directed to refund the $500.00 cash bond that was deposited on January 6, 2009 101 , to the law firm of Dornan, Lustgarten & Troia, PC LLO, 1403 Farnam Street, Suite 232, Omaha, Nebraska 68102. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy provided to Financial) (MKR)
February 24, 2014 Filing 543 MOTION for Release of Funds (Bond) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.(Dornan, Stuart)
February 7, 2014 TEXT ENTRY THAT Plaintiff's Exhibits 1-42 from Preliminary Injunction hearing held 12/23/2009 and Plaintiff's Exhibits 101-146, 154-156, 159, 162, 169-178, 180, 182, 190-193, 197-199, 209-211, 304 and 323 from Non-Jury Trial held 7/16 - 7/18/2012 destroyed on 2/7/2014 by Clerk of Court. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(JAB)
January 13, 2014 Filing 542 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Blake Richards regarding Order #539 . NOT REMAILED, NO LONGER WITH FIRM. (MKR)
January 7, 2014 Filing 541 EXHIBIT RECEIPT by Defendant's counsel (MKR)
January 6, 2014 Filing 540 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Kevin L. Griess regarding Order, (224 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 224 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 539 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 539 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 231 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 231 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ). NO LONGER WITH THE FIRM, NO FORWARDING INFORMATION. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(MKR)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER-Pursuant to NECivR 79.1(f) or NECrimR 55.1(g), counsel, shall either 1) withdraw the following exhibits previously submitted in this matter within 14 calendar days of the date of this order, or 2) show cause why the exhibits should not be destroyed: Exhibit numbers: All sealed and unsealed exhibits offered in these cases, Hearing type: All hearings held in these cases, If counsel fails to withdraw these exhibits as directed or to show cause why the exhibits should not be destroyed, the clerks office is directed to destroy the listed exhibits without further notice to the parties or order from the court. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
January 8, 2013 Filing 538 Costs Taxed regarding Bill of Costs (222 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 229 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 537 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) in amount of $9,896.56 against the defendants. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ. (MTB)
January 4, 2013 Filing 537 BILL OF COSTS Stipulated by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 536 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED that: Except as provided in the following paragraphs, judgment is entered for the defendants and against the plaintiffs providing that plaintiffs shall take nothing and these matters are dismissed with prejudice. Doe 24s "as-applied" challenge to Neb. Rev. Stat. 29-4006(2) under the Fourth Amendment and the equivalent Nebraska constitutional provision is not ripe and is therefore dismissed for lack of Article III jurisdiction. The claims of the plaintiffs who are not required to register as sex offenders as those claims pertain to Neb. Rev. Stat. 29-4006(1)(k) and (s), 29-4006(2), and 28-322.05 (West, Operative Jan. 1, 2010) are dismissed without prejudice because they are moot. The defendants and their agents, servants, employees, attorneys and any other persons acting in concert with them are permanently enjoined from enforcing the foregoing statutes. The plaintiffs are hereby awarded attorneys' fees against the defendants in the amount of $292,564.88. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d)(1), the plaintiffs are prevailing parties for purposes of taxation of costs. If the plaintiffs desire to recover costs, they must file the required documents with the Clerk within 14 days. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TCL )
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 535 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees and expenses (filing #527 ) is granted in part and denied in part, as follows: Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1988, the plaintiffs are hereby awarded total attorneys' fees against the defendants in the amount of $292,564.88. In all other respects, the plaintiffs' application is denied without prejudice to the plaintiffs' ability to seek taxation of costs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and 28 U.S.C. 1920. Plaintiffs' motion for hearing regarding attorneys' fees and expenses (filing #533 ) is denied. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TCL )
November 21, 2012 Filing 534 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Hearing Regarding Attorney Fees and Expenses(225 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 533 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 218 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
November 20, 2012 Filing 533 MOTION for Hearing Regarding Attorney Fees and Expenses by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
November 20, 2012 Filing 532 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees (219 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 212 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 527 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
November 16, 2012 Filing 531 INDEX in opposition to MOTION for Attorney Fees (212 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
November 16, 2012 Filing 530 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Attorney Fees (212 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
November 1, 2012 Filing 529 INDEX in support of Brief, (528 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 220 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 213 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Exhibit #3-9, #4 Exhibit #10, #5 Exhibit #11-17)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
November 1, 2012 Filing 528 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees (219 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 212 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 527 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
November 1, 2012 Filing 527 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
October 17, 2012 Filing 526 RESTRICTED STIPULATION (Exhibit 1) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of State of Nebraska, et al, Defendants and Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of John Doe and Jane Doe et al, Plaintiffs. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(MKR)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 525 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- IT IS ORDERED that: The Clerk of Court shall upload Courts Exhibit 1 to CM/ECF as a restricted document. Except as noted within this order, the Nebraska laws that were enacted by L97 (2009) and LB 285 (2009) are constitutional. The claims of the plaintiffs who are not required to register as sex offenders are dismissed without prejudice as moot. The claims of the plaintiffs who are shown on Courts Exhibit 1 to have withdrawn from participation in this lawsuit are dismissed without prejudice. Final judgment will be withheld pending resolution of the attorney fee issue. Counsel for the plaintiffs shall have until November 1, 2012, to submit anapplication, evidence, evidence index, and brief regarding attorney fees. Counsel for the defendants shall have until November 16, 2012, to respond with evidence, evidence index, and brief. Both sides shall give due attention to the local rules of practice regarding attorney fee applications. Counsel are also encouraged to settle the attorney fee issue, if they can, recognizing that the plaintiffs have been partially, but not wholly, successful.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
September 19, 2012 Filing 524 REPLY BRIEF by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
September 11, 2012 Filing 523 REPLY BRIEF Brief(207 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 522 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 214 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Rodney C. Dahlquist, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dahlquist, Rodney)
September 10, 2012 Filing 522 BRIEF (Post-Trial Brief) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
September 10, 2012 Filing 521 BRIEF (Closing Argument) by Attorney Rodney C. Dahlquist, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dahlquist, Rodney)
August 20, 2012 Filing 520 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume III of Trial Proceedings before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf held on July 18, 2012. Total Number of Billable Pages: 515-598. Total Number of Pages: 84. The transcript can only be viewed at the courts public terminal or purchased through Transcriber Rogene S. Schroder at (402) 661-7383 before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. Redaction Request due 9/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(RSS)
August 20, 2012 Filing 519 RESTRICTED TRANSCRIPT regarding Volume III of Trial Proceedings before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf held on July 18, 2012. Transcriber Rogene S. Schroder. Total Number of Billable Pages: Pages 509-514. Total Number of Pages: 6. THIS DOCKET ENTRY AND PDF DOCUMENT ARE SEALED PURSUANT TO AN ORDER OF THE COURT AND/OR LEGAL AUTHORITY GOVERNING SEALED FILINGS. ACCESS IS LIMITED ONLY TO THE COURT. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(RSS) Modified on 9/19/2012 to restrict pursuant to Order 515 in case 8:09cv456 (AOA).
August 20, 2012 Filing 518 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume III of Trial Proceedings before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf held on July 18, 2012. Total Number of Billable Pages: Pages 447-508. Total Number of Pages: 62. The transcript can only be viewed at the courts public terminal or purchased through Transcriber Rogene S. Schroder at (402) 661-7383 before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. Redaction Request due 9/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(RSS)
August 20, 2012 Filing 517 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume II of Trial Proceedings before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf held on July 17, 2012. Total Number of Billable Pages: 235. Total Number of Pages: 235. The transcript can only be viewed at the courts public terminal or purchased through Transcriber Rogene S. Schroder at (402) 661-7383 before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. Redaction Request due 9/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(RSS)
August 20, 2012 Filing 516 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Volume I of Trial Proceedings before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf held on July 16, 2012. Total Number of Billable Pages: 211. Total Number of Pages: 211. The transcript can only be viewed at the courts public terminal or purchased through Transcriber Rogene S. Schroder at (402) 661-7383 before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. # Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. Redaction Request due 9/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(RSS)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER - The Unopposed Motion for Permission to Restrict (filing no. 513) is granted. As provided below, the Unopposed Motion to Redact (filing no. 514) is granted in part and otherwise, to wit: As of approximately 2:21 P.M. on July 23, 2012, the digital audio recording for the morning session of July 18, 2012 of the non jury trial has been restricted so that it may only be accessed by counsel of record and case participants. The transcriber has been notified when preparing the transcript to file the bench conference separately as a restricted document. The motion is otherwise denied. This order pertains to Case Nos. 4:10CV3005 and 4:09CV3266. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
July 20, 2012 Filing 514 Unopposed RESTRICTED MOTION regarding Unopposed MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act (205 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 198 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 513 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K, Intervenor Parties John Doe 21-23, John Doe 21-23.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
July 20, 2012 Filing 513 Unopposed MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K, Intervenor Parties John Doe 21-23, John Doe 21-23.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 512 LETTER BY CLERK that a CD was sent to Rogene Schroder for transcription regarding Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, Non-Jury Trial - Ended,,,, (506 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 506 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), Non-Jury Trial - Began,,, (498 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), Non-Jury Trial Held,, (502 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ). Transcript ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(SCR, )
July 19, 2012 Filing 511 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Post, Ryan)
July 18, 2012 Filing 510 EXHIBIT LIST from Non-Jury Trial held held on July 16, 2012 - July 18, 2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(AOA) (Modified on 1/7/2014 to attach #1 Court Exhibit 1 per CCB) (JAB)
July 18, 2012 Filing 509 WITNESS LIST from non-jury trial held On July 16, 2012 - July 18, 2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(AOA)
July 18, 2012 Filing 508 AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 07/18/2012 1:29:56 PM ]. File Size [ 22492 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:33:43 ]. (Non-Jury Trial hearing (Afternoon Session)). (auto-docket).
July 18, 2012 Filing 507 RESTRICTED AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 07/18/2012 8:28:20 AM ]. File Size [ 35871 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:29:28 ]. (Non-Jury Trial hearing (Morning Session)). (auto-docket). Modified on 7/23/2012 to restrict per RGK chambers (AOA).
July 18, 2012 Filing 506 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for non- jury trial proceedings held before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf on 7/18/2012 in Lincoln. Evidence by Plaintiff. Defendant's motion for dismissal pursuant to Rule 50 is denied. Evidence by Defendant. Non-Jury Trial concluded. Matter submitted. Written Order forthcoming. Appearance for Plaintiff: Rodney C. Dahlquist, Stu Dornan, Thomas Monaghan; for Defendant: Katie Spohn, Kevin Griess and Ryan Post; Courtroom Deputy: Abby Ayodele; Court Reporter: Digital Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ Time Start: 9:07 AM; Time Stop: 3:07 PM; Time in Court: 3 Hours 44 Minutes. (AOA)
July 18, 2012 Filing 505 MOTION to Dismiss Parties filed by Attorneys Kevin L. Griess and Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants State of Nebraska, et al. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ (TEL)
July 17, 2012 Filing 504 AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 07/17/2012 1:40:50 PM ]. File Size [ 39423 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:44:16 ]. (Non Jury Trial (Afternoon Session)). (auto-docket).
July 17, 2012 Filing 503 AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 07/17/2012 6:58:19 AM ]. File Size [ 44743 KB ]. Run Time [ 03:06:26 ]. (Non-Jury Trial (Morning Session)). (auto-docket).
July 17, 2012 Filing 502 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for non- jury trial proceedings held before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf on 7/17/2012 in Lincoln. Evidence by Plaintiff and Defendant. Non-Jury Trial not concluded, continued to 9:00 a.m. on July 18, 2012 in Courtroom 2 Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Appearance for Plaintiff: Rodney C. Dahlquist, Stu Dornan, Thomas Monaghan; for Defendant: Katie Spohn, Kevin Griess and Ryan Post; Courtroom Deputy: Abby Ayodele; Court Reporter: Digital. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ Time Start: 8:06 AM; Time Stop: 4:56 PM; Time in Court: 5 Hours 52 Minutes. (AOA)
July 16, 2012 Filing 501 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT (STIPULATION) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn, Stuart J. Dornan. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(AOA)
July 16, 2012 Filing 500 AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 07/16/2012 12:58:49 PM ]. File Size [ 53532 KB ]. Run Time [ 03:43:03 ]. (Non-jury Trial (Afternoon Session)). (auto-docket).
July 16, 2012 Filing 499 AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 07/16/2012 10:25:06 AM ]. File Size [ 20473 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:25:18 ]. (Non-jury Trial (Morning Session)). (auto-docket).
July 16, 2012 Filing 498 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for non- jury trial proceedings held before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf on 7/16/2012 in Lincoln. Opening Statements. Evidence by Plaintiff and Defendant. Non-Jury Trial not concluded, continued to 8:00 a.m. on July 17, 2012 in Courtroom 2 Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Appearance for Plaintiff: Rodney C. Dahlquist, Stu Dornan, Thomas Monaghan; for Defendant: Katie Spohn, Kevin Griess and Ryan Post; Courtroom Deputies: Abby Ayodele; Court Reporter: Digital. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ Time Start: 10:46 AM; Time Stop: 5:02 PM; Time in Court: 5 Hours 7 Minutes. (AOA) Modified on 7/17/2012 to change date (AOA).
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER - Filing #485 , the Magistrate Judges recommendation, is adopted. Filing #459 , the Unopposed Motion to Dismiss as to Does 1 and 22, is granted, and, as to these two plaintiffs only, that their claims are dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
July 9, 2012 Filing 496 BRIEF (Trial Brief) and Proposed Findings of Fact by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
July 9, 2012 Filing 495 BRIEF Pretrial by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
July 9, 2012 Filing 494 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
July 9, 2012 Filing 493 EXHIBIT LIST by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
July 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 492 PRETRIAL ORDER - estimated length of trial is 4 days; Non-Jury Trial set for 7/16/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
July 2, 2012 Filing 491 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE re Restricted Document,, (479 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 171 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 163 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ), Restricted Document,, (172 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 164 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 480 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Deputy Clerk. The attorney login does not match the s/signature on this document. This notice is for your information for future filings.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(MKR)
June 29, 2012 Filing 490 EXHIBIT RECEIPT by Defendant's counsel from hearing held on 6/29/12. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(MKR)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 489 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to Plaintiffs Motion to Extend the Deposition Deadline, #455 , Defendants Motion for Sanctions, #461 , and Defendants Motions to Quash, [464, 466, 468, 469, 470, 474 and 481]. The deadline for filing any objections to the orders entered herein is expedited, and any objections shall be filed on or before July 5, 2012.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 488 TEXT ORDER granting (478) Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
June 29, 2012 Filing 487 EXHIBIT LIST from hearing held on 6/29/2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ (TEL)
June 29, 2012 Filing 486 AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 06/29/2012 1:58:06 PM ]. File Size [ 20767 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:26:32 ]. (Motion Hearing). (auto-docket).
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 485 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that the plaintiffs unopposed motion to dismiss, #459 , be granted, and that Does 1 and 22 be dismissed without prejudice.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
June 29, 2012 Filing 484 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart in Lincoln on 6/29/2012. Motion Hearing held on Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Deposition Deadline #455 ; Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Parties #459 ; Defendant's Motion for Sanctions #461 ; and Defendant's Motions to Quash #464 #466 #468 #469 #470 #474 #481 . Magistrate Judge Zwart will recommend to District Judge Richard G. Kopf that the unopposed Motion to Dismiss Parties Does 1 and 22 #459 be granted. Written Findings and Recommendation to issue. Argument on Defendant's Motion for Sanctions #461 . Response by Plaintiff. Matter submitted. Defendant's Motion for Sanctions #461 is denied. The duplicate filings of Defendant's Motion for Sanctions (filings 153 in 4:09cv3266 and 145 in 4:10cv3005) are hereby withdrawn. Argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Deposition Deadline #455 . Response by Defendant. Matter submitted. Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Deposition Deadline #455 is denied. Argument on Defendant's Motions to Quash #464 #474 #481 . Response by Plaintiff. Matter submitted. Defendant's Motions to Quash #464 #474 #481 are sustained. Argument on Defendant's Motions to Quash #466 #468 #469 #470 . Response by Plaintiff. Matter submitted. Defendant's Motions to Quash #466 #468 #469 #470 are sustained. Magistrate rulings subject to appeal. Expedited Objection deadline. Clerk to transcribe hearing in an expedited matter at parties' request. Appearance for Plaintiff: Rodney C. Dahlquist and Thomas J. Monaghan. Appearance for Defendants: Katherine J. Spohn and James D. Smith. Courtroom Deputy: Troy E. Lieberth; Court Reporter: Digital. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ Time Start: 1:58 PM; Time Stop: 3:25 PM; Time in Court: 1 Hour 27 Minutes. (TEL)
June 29, 2012 Filing 483 INDEX in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena of John Harms(481 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 165 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 173 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party John Harms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kevin Griess, #2 Exhibit Subpoena of John of Harms)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 482 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena of John Harms(481 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 165 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 173 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party John Harms.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 481 MOTION to Quash Subpoena of John Harms by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party John Harms.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 480 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Index of Exhibits and Exhibits regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Brief and Index of Exhibits(170 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 162 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 478 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1-3)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 29, 2012 Filing 479 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Brief regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Brief and Index of Exhibits(170 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 162 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 478 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 29, 2012 Filing 478 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Brief and Index of Exhibits by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 29, 2012 Filing 477 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE re Index,,,, (473 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Deputy Clerk. The attorney login does not match the s/signature on this document. This notice is for your information for future filings. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(MKR)
June 28, 2012 Filing 476 INDEX in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena(474 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 166 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 158 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Scott Lautenbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 475 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena(474 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 166 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 158 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Scott Lautenbaugh.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 474 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Scott Lautenbaugh.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 473 INDEX in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena(158 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 150 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 466 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), MOTION to Quash Subpoena(153 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 161 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 469 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), MOTION to Quash Subpoena(152 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 160 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 468 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), MOTION to Quash Subpoena(470 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 154 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 162 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ), MOTION to Quash Subpoena(464 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 156 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 148 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Katherine J. Spohn, #2 Exhibit Subpoena of Peter Pirsch, #3 Exhibit Subpoena of Jon Bruning, #4 Exhibit Subpoena of David Cookson, #5 Exhibit Subpoena of John Freudenberg, #6 Exhibit Subpoena of Corey O'Brien)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER SETTING HEARING:1) On or before 12:00 p.m. (noon) on June 28, 2012, the defendant shall file an index of evidence with copies of the subpoenas underlying their motions to quash;2) On or before 12:00 p.m. (noon) on June 29, 2012, the plaintiffs shall file any written response to the defendants" motions to quash;3) An oral argument on all pending motions in this case (Plaintiffs' motion to extend the deposition deadline; Defendants' motion for sanctions; Defendants' motions to quash) will be held on June 29, 2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. In Court Hearing set for Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
June 27, 2012 Filing 471 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena(153 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 469 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 161 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ), MOTION to Quash Subpoena(152 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 160 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 468 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), MOTION to Quash Subpoena(470 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 154 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 162 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Parties Dave Cookson, John Freudenberg, Corey O'Brien.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 470 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Corey O'Brien.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 469 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party John Freudenberg.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 468 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Dave Cookson.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 467 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena(158 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 150 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 466 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 466 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 465 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Quash Subpoena(156 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 148 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 464 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Pete Pirsch.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 464 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Interested Party Pete Pirsch.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 26, 2012 Filing 463 INDEX in support of MOTION for Sanctions (145 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 26, 2012 Filing 462 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Sanctions (145 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 26, 2012 Filing 461 MOTION for Sanctions by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 26, 2012 Filing 460 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Extend Deposition Deadline(140 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 22, 2012 Filing 459 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party John Does 1 and 22 by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.(Dornan, Stuart)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 458 TEXT ORDER. This case is scheduled to be tried in less than a month. Accordingly, defendants' response to the plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Deposition Deadline(455 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 148 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 140 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) shall be filed on or before June 26, 2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
June 21, 2012 Filing 457 INDEX in support of MOTION to Extend Deposition Deadline(140 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 148 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 455 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), Brief, (149 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 456 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 141 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 21, 2012 Filing 456 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Extend Deposition Deadline(140 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 148 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 455 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 21, 2012 Filing 455 MOTION to Extend Deposition Deadline by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 15, 2012 Filing 454 NOTICE of Serving Documents by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 453 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - the Magistrate Judges Memorandum and Order (filing #447 in Case No. 8:09CV456) shall not be disturbed and is hereby sustained; Defendants statement of objections to the aforesaid memorandum and order (filing in #448 Case No. 8:09CV456) is denied; and the stay of the Magistrate Judges order is lifted and Defendants shall produce all non-privileged documents on or before June 15, 2012. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 452 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting (450) Motion to Stay in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ; granting (142) Motion to Stay in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ; granting (135) Motion to Stay in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ. The deadline for disclosing materials in accordance with this courts order dated May 14, 2012 is stayed pending further order of the court. The clerk shall file this memorandum and order in the lead case, 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, as a spread text order. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
May 23, 2012 Filing 451 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Stay OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER(135 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
May 23, 2012 Filing 450 MOTION to Stay OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
May 23, 2012 Filing 449 BRIEF in support of Statement, (133 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) OF OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
May 23, 2012 Filing 448 STATEMENT OF OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine) Modified on 5/23/2012 to change event from statement to objection to magistrate judge's order per conversation with Attorney General's office (CCB).
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 447 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Order on Restricted Motion (442 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ). On February 28, 2012 the undersigned ordered Defendants to submit certain documents for an in camera review to determine whether the documents were shielded from discovery by the attorney/client privilege and/or the deliberative process privilege. After review, IT IS ORDERED: 1) Documents Nos. 1a, 1b, 2 & 3 of Exhibit C are protected by the deliberative process privilege and shall not be produced. 2) All of the remaining documents listed on Defendants' privilege log shall beproduced to Plaintiffs on or before May 25, 2012. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
May 1, 2012 Filing 446 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David G. Post by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
March 16, 2012 Filing 445 NOTICE of Filing Documents under Seal by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
March 9, 2012 Filing 443 NOTICE of Serving Documents by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 442 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (425) RESTRICTED MOTION in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ; granting in part and denying in part (118) RESTRICTED MOTION in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ and granting in part and denying in part (112) RESTRICTED MOTION in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ. With respect to the documents numbered 22, 23, 24, & 25 on Filing No. 425-3, Ex. B, Plaintiffs' motion to compel (filing no. #425 ) is granted. Defendants shall produce those documents to Plaintiffs by March 9, 2012. Defendants shall file the remaining documents identified in Filing Nos. 425-3, Exs. B and C under seal by March 16, 2012 in order for the undersigned to conduct an in camera review and determine if the claimed privileges apply. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER granting #440 the Unopposed Motion to Dismiss as to Does 8 and A as to these two plaintiffs only, that their claims are dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
February 24, 2012 Filing 440 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party Doe A and Doe 8 by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.(Dornan, Stuart)
February 20, 2012 Filing 439 REPLY BRIEF in support of Brief,, (132 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 125 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 438 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ), RESTRICTED MOTION regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act (111 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDER(112 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
February 13, 2012 Filing 438 BRIEF in opposition to RESTRICTED MOTION regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act (111 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDER(118 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 112 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 425 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 437 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - After conferring with the parties, and with their agreement, 4-day Bench Trial continued to 7/16/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference continued to 7/3/2012 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB) Modified on 2/14/2012 to reflect trial is to the bench. (JAB)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 436 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 2/10/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. The Court will provide call-in telephone conference information to all counsel.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
January 31, 2012 Filing 435 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe K by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 434 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe J by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 433 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe I by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 432 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe H by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 431 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe G by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 430 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe F by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 429 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe E by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 31, 2012 Filing 428 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe A by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 427 TEXT ORDER granting (424) Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
January 27, 2012 Filing 426 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING BRIEF AND INDEX ATTACHED TO MOTION regarding Restricted Motion #425 by Deputy Clerk. Briefs and Indexes shall be electronically filed as a separate document using the brief or index event. The brief and index must identify the document to which it relates. This notice is for your information for future filings.(MKR)
January 26, 2012 Filing 425 RESTRICTED MOTION regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act (111 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A-E)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
January 26, 2012 Filing 424 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
January 11, 2012 Filing 423 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 35 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER granting the Unopposed #421 Motion to Dismiss Party as to John Does 15, 29, 30, 32 and 34. These five plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
January 6, 2012 Filing 421 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party John Does 15, 29, 30, 32 and 34 by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.(Dornan, Stuart)
December 13, 2011 Filing 420 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 35 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 419 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 36 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 418 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 34 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 417 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 32 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 416 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 30 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 415 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 29 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 414 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 25 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 413 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 24 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 412 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 20 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 411 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 19 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 13, 2011 Filing 410 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Doe 15 by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting (404) Motion to Compel in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ; granting (99) Motion to Compel in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ; granting (93) Motion to Compel in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Plaintiffs request for a protective order limiting discovery is granted under the terms set forth in this Memorandum and Order. The clerk shall file this memorandum and order in the lead case, 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, as a spread text order. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005- RGK -CRZ Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
September 26, 2011 Filing 408 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Compel(93 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 404 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 99 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The plaintiffs responses to the defendants motions to compel shall be filed on or before September 26, 2011. No reply shall be filed absent leave of the court for good cause shown. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
September 13, 2011 Filing 406 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel(404 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
September 13, 2011 Filing 405 INDEX in support of MOTION to Compel(404 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 3, #2 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 6, #3 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 7, #4 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 11, #5 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 12, #6 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 16, #7 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 17, #8 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 21, #9 Exhibit Certified Questions Doe 23, #10 Exhibit Deposition Transcript Doe 3, #11 Exhibit Deposition Transcript Doe 12)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
September 13, 2011 Filing 404 MOTION to Compel by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
August 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting #401 Motion for Protective Order in Lead Case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ and in Member Cases: 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, (filing no. 96) and 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ (filing no. 90).Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
August 19, 2011 Filing 402 NOTICE of Serving Discovery Requests by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
August 19, 2011 Filing 401 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER SETTING HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 1/26/2012 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Judge Zwart's chambers will provide conferencing instructions.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 399 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 8/10/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Judge Zwart's chambers will email conferencing instructions to counsel. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
July 8, 2011 Filing 398 NOTICE of Serving Discovery Requests by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the parties' supplemental Joint [396) Stipulation in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ; granting #91 Stipulation in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ; granting #85 Stipulation in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. The parties are hereby ordered to comply with the terms and conditions of their Supplemental Joint Stipulation and Protective Order #91 , #396 and #85 . Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. The clerk shall file this memorandum and order in the lead case, 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, as a spread text order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
June 17, 2011 Filing 396 Joint STIPULATION by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The Magistrate Judges memorandum and order (filing #384 in Case No. 8:09CV456) shall not be disturbed and is hereby sustained; The defendant's objection to and appeal from the Magistrate Judge's memorandum and order #386 in Case No. 8:09cv456) is denied. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
May 24, 2011 Filing 394 REPLY BRIEF in support of OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER(75 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
May 17, 2011 Filing 393 BRIEF in opposition to OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER(386 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 75 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 81 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER adopting (391) Joint Stipulation for Protective Order in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ; adopting (86) Joint Stipulation for Protective Order in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ; adopting (80) Joint Stipulation for Protective Order in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
May 6, 2011 Filing 391 Joint STIPULATION by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting ( #388 ) Motion to Stay in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ; granting (83) Motion to Stay in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ; granting (77) Motion to Stay in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Defendants' motion to stay discovery is granted pending the resolution of Defendants' Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order, (filing no. #386 ) with respect to the subset of documents as set out in this order. Defendants' motion to stay is denied to the extent it seeks to stay discovery involving any documents not included in the above-described subset. The clerk shall file this memorandum and order in the lead case,8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, as a spread text order. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
May 3, 2011 Filing 389 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Stay of Magistrate Judge's Order(388 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
May 3, 2011 Filing 388 MOTION to Stay of Magistrate Judge's Order by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
May 3, 2011 Filing 387 BRIEF in support of OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER(386 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
May 3, 2011 Filing 386 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER granting Motion to Dismiss Party #382 . IT IS ORDERED that filing #382 , the Unopposed Motion to Dismiss as to John Doe 20 and John Doe C, is granted, and, as to these two plaintiffs only, that their claims are dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TEL)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -The Plaintiffs motion to compel, (filing no. #374 ), is granted in part and denied in part as set forth within the order. The defendants unopposed motions to continue, (filing no. #383 ), are granted. The pretrial conference and trial of the above-captioned cases are continued pending further order of the court. The clerk shall file this memorandum and order in the lead case, 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, as a spread text order. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005- RGK -CRZ Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
April 6, 2011 Filing 383 Unopposed MOTION to Continue by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
April 6, 2011 Filing 382 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party John Doe 20 and John Doe C by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.(Dornan, Stuart)
March 18, 2011 Filing 381 NOTICE of Serving Discovery Responses by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
March 1, 2011 Filing 380 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Discovery(71 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 65 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 374 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ), Index,, (375 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 66 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 72 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ), Brief, (74 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 68 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 377 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 379 TEXT ORDER granting (378) Motion for Leave in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ; granting (75) Motion for Leave in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ; granting (69) Motion for Leave in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. The plaintiffs' reply in support of their motion to compel shall be filed on or before March 1,2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
February 17, 2011 Filing 378 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
February 14, 2011 Filing 377 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Compel Discovery(65 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
January 28, 2011 Filing 376 NOTICE of Serving Expert Report by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 28, 2011 Filing 375 INDEX in support of MOTION to Compel Discovery(71 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 65 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 374 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
January 28, 2011 Filing 374 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER - The defendants unopposed amended motions to extend the expert witnessdeadline, (8:09-cv-00456, filing no. #372 ; 4:09-cv-03266, filing no. 69; and4:10-cv-03005, filing no. 63) are granted, and a. The defendants expert witness disclosure deadline is extended to January 28, 2011. b. The plaintiffs deadline for filing of any motion to exclude expert testimony on Daubert and related grounds is extended to February 11, 2011. The defendants motions to extend the expert witness deadline, (8:09-cv-00456, filing no. #371 ; 4:09-cv-03266, filing no. 68; and 4:10-cv-03005, filing no. 62) are denied as moot. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005- RGK -CRZ Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
January 21, 2011 Filing 372 Amended MOTION to Extend (Unopposed) Unopposed MOTION to Extend(371 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 21, 2011 Filing 371 Unopposed MOTION to Extend by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 14, 2011 Filing 370 NOTICE of Serving Discovery Requests by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 369 TEXT ORDER granting (368) Motion to Extend in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ;Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03004-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Defendants' deadline to serve responses to Plaintiffs interrogatories and requests for production of documents is extended to January 21, 2011 and the deadline for Defendants to file any Motion to Compel is extended to January 28, 2011.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
January 11, 2011 Filing 368 Unopposed MOTION to Extend by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 23, 2010 Filing 367 NOTICE Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
December 17, 2010 Filing 366 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure and Notice of Serving Expert Report by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 365 TEXT ORDER granting (363) Motion to Extend in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ; and the related motions in Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03004-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ. Plaintiffs' expert report shall be served on or before December 17, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
December 9, 2010 Filing 364 NOTICE of Serving Discovery Requests by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
December 8, 2010 Filing 363 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline to File an Expert Report Order Setting Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case, (57 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 51 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 360 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
November 16, 2010 Filing 362 NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
October 29, 2010 Filing 361 NOTICE of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 360 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 1/28/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2011 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Jury Trial set for 5/23/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge Richard G. Kopf.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ et al.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS) Modified on 9/20/2010 to correct filed date(MKR).
September 15, 2010 Filing 359 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
September 15, 2010 Filing 358 Joint STIPULATION regarding Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Objection,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (45 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 45 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 45 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 45 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ, 354 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 354 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 354 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 354 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 51 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 51 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 51 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 51 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
August 18, 2010 Filing 357 NOTICE of Appearance (Amended) by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK -CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03004-RGK -CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK -CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
August 18, 2010 Filing 356 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03004-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Griess, Kevin)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 355 SCHEDULING PACKET - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/15/2010. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03004-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Defendants original motion for summary judgment (Case No. 8:09CV456 filing #317 , Case No. 4:09CV3266 filing 23, Case No. 4:10CV3004 filing 22, Case No. 4:10CV3005 filing 17) is denied without prejudice, as moot. Defendants amended motion for summary judgment (Case No. 8:09CV456 filing #336 , Case No. 4:09CV3266 filing 35, Case No. 4:10CV3004 filing 34, Case No. 4:10CV3005 filing 29) is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth within the order. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment (Case No. 8:09CV456 filing #344 , Case No. 4:09CV3266 filing 41, Case No. 4:10CV3005 filing 35) is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth within the order. Defendants objections to Plaintiffs exhibits (Case No. 8:09CV456 filing #349 , Case No. 4:09CV3266 filing 46, Case No. 4:10CV3005 filing 40) are denied without prejudice. Within 30 days, the parties shall provide me with a stipulation designating those Plaintiffs who fit within this categorysex offenders who were not on probation, parole or court-monitored supervision as of January 1, 2010 together with the date when the offender was no longer under criminal justice supervision. If, for some reason, the parties cannot reach agreement, they shall arrange a telephone conference with me by contacting my judicial assistant. These cases are referred to Magistrate Judge Zwart for further progression, as appropriate. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C) Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03004-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZOrdered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
June 11, 2010 Filing 353 INDEX in support of Reply Brief,, (352 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 49 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 43 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) and Objection to Defendants' Brief in Support of Objection to Plaintiffs' Evidence by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 - Skaggs v. NSP BOE, #2 Exhibit #2 - Skaggs v. NSP Order, #3 Exhibit #3 - Legislative Committee Statement)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
June 11, 2010 Filing 352 REPLY BRIEF in opposition to Reply Brief,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (48 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 351 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 42 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) and Objection to Defendants' Brief in Support of Objection to Plaintiffs' Evidence by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
May 28, 2010 Filing 351 REPLY BRIEF in support of Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment(29 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 35 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 336 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
May 28, 2010 Filing 350 BRIEF in support of OBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary JudgmentOBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(40 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
May 28, 2010 Filing 349 OBJECTION to Index,,,, (37 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 348 TEXT ORDER granting (347) Stipulation in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ. Defendants shall file their Response to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for SummaryJudgment on or by May 28, 2010, and Plaintiffs Reply shall be filed on or by June 11, 2010. References to the Complaint (Filing 1) in Plaintiffs Brief in Support of their Objection to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing 345), are deemed to refer to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Filing 329). Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ, )
May 6, 2010 Filing 347 STIPULATION by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
April 30, 2010 Filing 346 INDEX in support of Brief, (36 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 345 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 42 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ) in Support of Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 - Part 1 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing, #2 Exhibit #1 - Part 2 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing, #3 Exhibit #2 Skaggs v. NSP Brief, #4 Exhibit #3 Skaggs v. NSP Order, #5 Exhibit #4 Journal Star Article, #6 Exhibit #5 NSP SOR Home Page, #7 Exhibit #6 NSP SOR Search Page, #8 Exhibit #7 Notification of Responsibilities, #9 Exhibit #8 Affidavit of Steven Donnelly, #10 Exhibit #9 Declaration of John Doe, #11 Exhibit #10 - #16 Second Declarations of Does 2, 7, 12, 15, 22, 28 and 36, #12 Exhibit #17 Legislature Committee Statement)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
April 30, 2010 Filing 345 BRIEF in support of Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
April 30, 2010 Filing 344 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 36, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ(Dornan, Stuart)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting (341) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 8:09-cv-00456. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
April 16, 2010 Filing 342 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Tonya L. Peters on behalf of Defendant Thomas K. Casady (Peters, Tonya)
April 16, 2010 Filing 341 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Richard C. Anderson on behalf of Defendant Thomas K. Casady.(Anderson, Richard)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying (331) Motion for Certification of State Law Questions to the Nebraska Supreme Court in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ (filing (43) in case 4:09-cv-03258-RGK-CRZ; filing (32) in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ; filing (26) in case 4:10-cv-03003-RGK-CRZ; filing (31) in case 4:10-cv-03004-RGK-CRZ; filing(26) in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 339 BRIEF in support of Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment(336 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) Amended by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
April 6, 2010 Filing 338 INDEX in support of Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment(336 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David D. Cookson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of David D. Cookson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of David D. Cookson, #4 Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #5 Exhibit 1a to Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #6 Exhibit 1b to Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #7 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #8 Affidavit of Leslie Levy)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
April 6, 2010 Filing 337 BRIEF in support of Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment(336 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
April 6, 2010 Filing 336 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
March 29, 2010 Filing 335 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Certification of State Law Questions to the Nebraska Supreme Court(331 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Attorney Todd D. Wilson is to register for the System. Show Cause Deadline set for 4/9/2010.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copies mailed (MKR)
March 22, 2010 Filing 333 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #329 by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman(Spohn, Katherine)
March 15, 2010 Filing 332 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Certification of State Law Questions to the Nebraska Supreme Court(26 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Dornan, Stuart)
March 15, 2010 Filing 331 MOTION for Certification of State Law Questions to the Nebraska Supreme Court by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Dornan, Stuart)
March 15, 2010 Filing 330 INDEX in support of Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #329 by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declarations of Does 21-36)(Dornan, Stuart)
March 15, 2010 Filing 329 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark(County Attorneys (Blaine)), Glenn Clark(County Attorneys (Valley)), Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott(County Attorneys (Keya Paha)), Eric Scott(County Attorneys (Cherry)), Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K(Dornan, Stuart)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting (320) Motion to Stay; granting (325) Stipulation in case 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ; granting (36) Motion to Stay; granting (41) Stipulation in case 4:09-cv-03258-RGK-CRZ; granting (26) Motion to Stay; granting (30) Stipulation in case 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ; granting (19) Motion to Stay; granting (24) Stipulation in case 4:10-cv-03003-RGK-CRZ; granting (29) Stipulation; granting (25) Motion to Stay in case 4:10-cv-03004-RGK-CRZ; granting (20) Motion to Stay; granting (24) Stipulation in case 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ. Parties to be added and their Declarations shall be filed on or before March 15, 2010. Any Motion for Certification of State Law Questions to the Nebraska Supreme Court shall be filed by March 15, 2010. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment or their own Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and supporting briefs by May 1,2010. The deadline for filing the parties Rule 26(f) Report, previously set for March 5, 2010, is continued until thirty days following the courts ruling on defendants' motions for summary judgment. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The unopposed motion to withdraw filed by former Platte County Attorney, Sandra J. Allen, and acting Platte County Attorney, Carl K. Hart, Jr., as counsel of record for Platte County, Nebraska, (filing no. #323 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
March 2, 2010 Filing 326 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of preliminary injunction proceedings before District Judge Richard G. Kopf held on December 23, 2009. Number of Pages: 119. The transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan M. DeVetter at (402) 661-7309 or suedevetter@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. #Click here to view the Transcript Redaction Procedure. Redaction Request due 3/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (SMD)
March 1, 2010 Filing 325 Joint STIPULATION regarding MOTION to Stay Discovery(320 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that a telephonic conference will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on 3/1/2010 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for the defendants shall place the call as ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al. (SED)
February 26, 2010 Filing 323 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Attorney Carl K. Hart, Jr on behalf of Defendant Sandra J. Allen.(Hart, Carl)
February 26, 2010 Filing 322 TEXT NOTICE OF INDEX OF EVIDENCE (23 in 4:10-cv-03004-RGK-CRZ, 18 in 4:10-cv-03005-RGK-CRZ, 24 in 4:09-cv-03266-RGK-CRZ, 17 in 4:10-cv-03003-RGK-CRZ, 318 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 34 in 4:09-cv-03258-RGK-CRZ) by Deputy Clerk. Pursuant to NECivR 7.0.1(a)(2) and (b)(2), evidence in support of a motion or brief shall be identified on an electronically-filed index of evidence. The index of evidence must identify the motion or brief to which it relates. Attachments to the index must be described using the System-generated prompt box. This notice is for your information for future filings.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(JAB) Modified on 2/26/2010 to reflect attachments to the brief are a comparison requested by the Judge in order #50 , not evidence. (JAB)
February 25, 2010 Filing 321 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to sallen@megavision.com regarding filings #317 , #318 , #319 and #320 in this case and the same documents in consolidated cases. E-mail not remailed, attorney is no longer with the Platte County Attorney's Office. New Platte County Attorney will file substitution of counsel. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(JAB)
February 25, 2010 Filing 320 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
February 25, 2010 Filing 319 INDEX in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment(317 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David D. Cookson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of David D. Cookson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of David D. Cookson, #4 Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #5 Exhibit 1a to Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #6 Exhibit 1b to Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #7 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of Shawn Edwards, #8 Affidavit of Leslie Levy)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
February 25, 2010 Filing 318 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment(317 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ) by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2)Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
February 25, 2010 Filing 317 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Timothy F. Dunning, Alex Hayes, Donald W. Kleine, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner.Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
February 8, 2010 Filing 316 ANSWER to Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman(Spohn, Katherine)
February 5, 2010 Filing 315 NOTICE of Limited Participation by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, David Heineman, Lancaster County Sheriff, Lincoln Police Dept., Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Jeff Davis, Nebraska State Patrol, Lee Polikov, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Alex Hayes, Nebraska State Patrol, Bryan Tuma, Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis D. Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Fegler Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas B. Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George L. Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie L. Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul B. Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James L. Zimmerman, Jon Bruning, Martin Gutschenritter, Rebecca Harling, Jerome Kramer, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Jon Bruning, Thomas K. Casady, Gary Lacey, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma, Terry Wagner Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(Spohn, Katherine)
January 29, 2010 Filing 314 LETTER BY CLERK that a CD was sent to Sue DeVetter for transcription regarding Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Motion Hearing, (76 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 76 in 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ). Transcript ordered by Stuart J. Dornan. THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT. ACCESS IS LIMITED TO COUNSEL OF RECORD AND THE COURT. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(SLP)
January 28, 2010 Filing 313 REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on December 23, 2009 before District Judge Richard G. Kopf by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.(Dornan, Stuart)
January 25, 2010 Filing 311 NOTICE of Limited Participation by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, Nebraska, State of, Bryan Tuma Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ, 4:10-cv-03004-RGK-CRZ(Spohn, Katherine)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On or before February 26, 2010, counsel for the parties in all six cases shall confer, either in person, telephonically, or by facsimile or electronic mail, to jointly complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report. If an initial planning conference is not warranted and the parties can agree on all the deadlines identified in the Rule 26(f) Report, the Report shall be completed and filed on or before March 5, 2010. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
January 22, 2010 Filing 312 Copy of ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER from the Nebraska Supreme Court and Nebraska Court of Appeals regarding case In re Appl for Exercise of Administrative Authority of Chief Justice, case number S-33-100002. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00456-RGK-CRZ et al.(JAB)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - These six cases are consolidated for all purposes including trial and discovery. Counsel and the Clerk are ordered to proceed as follows when filing documents and otherwise processing these cases. John Doe, et al., v. State of Nebraska, et al., Case No. 8:09CV456 (D. Neb. 2009) is hereby designated as the "Lead Case." The other five cases are each designated as a "Member Case". The motions to consolidate (filings No. #82 and #88 in 8:09CV456; filing 11 in 4:09CV3258; filing 2 in 4:09CV3266) are granted as provided herein but otherwise denied. By agreement of the parties, any demand for a jury is withdrawn. The consolidated cases are designated as non-jury cases. By agreement of the parties, all plaintiffs shall have the benefit of the preliminary injunction previously issued in the "Lead Case." This matter is referred to Judge Zwart for further progression and the issuance of scheduling packet tailored to the needs of the consolidated cases. Each of the defendants is given until February 8, 2010 to answer or further plead. The motion for extension of time (filing 12 in 4:09CV3266) is granted as provided herein and otherwise denied. The motion to intervene and related motion to use fictitious names (filings #70 and #71 in 8:09CV456) are denied without prejudice because no proposed pleading was filed as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(c). The motions to withdraw as attorneys (filings #94 and #304 in 8:09CV456) are granted. The motion to remand (filing 8 in 4:09CV3266) is denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
January 21, 2010 Filing 308 AUDIO FILE (12.5 MB) regarding Status Conference 307 held on 01/21/10 at 8:30 a.m. before District Judge Richard G. Kopf. (CCB)
January 21, 2010 Filing 307 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Kopf and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart in Lincoln on 1/21/2010. Status Conference Hearing held by telephone in Courtroom No. 1. Order forthcoming. Appearance for Plaintiffs: Stu Dornan, Thomas Monaghan, Joshua Weir, and Rodney Dahlquist, Jr.; State Defendants: David Cookson, Katherine Spahn; Douglas County Defendants: Jeffrey Lux; Sarpy County Defendants: Mike Smith and Tricia Freeman; Courtroom Deputy: Colleen Beran; Court Reporter: Digital. Time Commenced: 8:30 a.m.Time Concluded: 9:22 a.m. (CCB)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 306 TEXT ORDER - Regarding Magistrate Judge Zwart's Docket (General Order 2010-01). All cases previously assigned to District Judge Richard G. Kopf for pretrial management are herewith reassigned to Magistrate Judge Zwart. Magistrate Judge Zwart shall be paired with Judges Kopf and Urbom for the management of civil and criminal cases on Judges Kopf and Urbom's dockets. The Clerk of the Court shall provide notice of this order to counsel or parties in all cases which are reassigned to Magistrate Judge Zwart and for which there are currently matters pending. Notice need not be given in closed cases for which there are no matters pending. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JLS, )
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Counsel shall review the attachment listing all pending motions in these cases. Counsel shall be prepared to state their positions with respect to the pending motions and with respect to further progression of these cases. (Attachments: #1 Pending Motions)Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
January 19, 2010 Filing 304 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Blake T. Richards by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.(Dornan, Stuart)
January 15, 2010 Filing 303 NOTICE of Limited Participation by County Officials by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma (Spohn, Katherine)
January 13, 2010 Filing 302 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Kevin Stukenholtz on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 301 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Steve Hespen on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 300 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jeff Franklin on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 299 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Kirk W. Handrup on 1/8/2010. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 298 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant David T. Schroeder on 1/8/2010. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 297 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Richard Roberts on 1/11/2010. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 296 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Richard H. Roberts on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 295 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant James Swanson on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 294 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant David Spiegel on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 293 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Nels Sorensen on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 292 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Joseph M. Smith on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 291 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Bill Simpson on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 290 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant James P. Wenzl on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 289 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant David C. Weeks on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 288 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jerry Watson on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 287 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Tiffany Wasserburger on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 286 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Terry Wagner on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 285 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant James L. Wagner on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 284 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Dennis Ocken on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 283 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant John Zavadil on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 282 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Mark Young on 12/28/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 281 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Joe Yocum on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 280 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Paul Wood on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 279 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant David G. Wondra on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 278 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Todd D. Wilson on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 277 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant David L. Wilson on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 276 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Scott K. White on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 275 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jason White on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 274 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Rodney Wetovick on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 273 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Dale Radcliff on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 272 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Alan Moore on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 271 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant K. Patrick Mooney on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 270 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Neil A. Miller on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 269 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Doug Miller on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 268 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Douglas E. Merz on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 267 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Tammy Maul-Bodlak on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 266 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant James J. McNally on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 265 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Bryan S. McQuay on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 264 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Anthony McPhillips on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 263 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Timothy S. Schmidt on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 262 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Paul B. Schaub on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 261 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Daniel Rupp on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 260 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Steve Vinton on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 259 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant George G. Vinton on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 258 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Paul J. Vaughan on 12/29/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 257 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Michael Unger on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 256 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant John Thomas on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 255 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Scott J. Tingelhoff on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 254 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Timothy Sutherland on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 253 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Terry Robbins on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 252 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Randall Ritnour on 12/28/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 251 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jean Rhodes on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 250 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Patrick McNeil on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 249 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jeffrey S. Ortgies on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 248 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant James D. Owens on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 247 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Lynn Nichols on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 246 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Tom Nutt on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 245 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Ron Murtaugh on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 244 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Timothy S. Mullen on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 243 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Tammy Mowry on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 242 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Gary Lacey on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 241 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Paul J. Kruse on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 240 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jerome Kramer on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 239 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Larry Koranda on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 238 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Donald Klug on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 237 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Chris Kleinberg on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 236 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jerry McDole on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 235 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Robert S. McBride on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 234 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Ben Matchett on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 233 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant James R. Marr on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 232 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Gene Mahon on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 231 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Greg Magee on 12/27/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 230 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Dwaine W. Ladwig on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 229 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Verlyn Luebbe on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 228 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Gary Reiber on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 227 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jayme Reed on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 226 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Tim Sierks on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 225 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Tim Sieh on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 224 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Eric Scott(County Attorneys (Keya Paha)). (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 223 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Eric Scott(County Attorneys (Cherry)) on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 222 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jon S. Schroeder on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 221 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Harold Schenck on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 220 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Troy Schmitz on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 219 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Kevin Mueller on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 218 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant A. James Moravek on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 217 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Davis Moore on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 216 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Michael H. Powell on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 215 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Philip E. Pierce on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 214 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Michael E. Pieper on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 213 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Robert Pickell on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 212 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Joel W. Phillips on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 211 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Tom Patterson on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 210 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant David J. Partsch on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 209 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant William Roe on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 208 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Michael Robinson on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 207 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant W. Bert Lammli on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 206 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jim K. Lawson on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 205 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant David Lee on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 204 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Bryan Leggott on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 203 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Louie M. Ligouri on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 202 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Adrian Lindsey on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 201 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Brent Lottman on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 200 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Kathleen J. Hutchinson on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 199 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Casey D. Hurlburt on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 198 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant James F. Janecek on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 197 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Michael F. Janulewicz on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 196 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Darrell Johnson on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 195 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Lester E. Johnson on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 194 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Kurt Kapperman on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 193 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Dennis King on 12/24/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 192 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jeff Kirsch on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 191 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Alex Hayes on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 190 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Shawn Hebbert on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 189 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Mark Hecker on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 188 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Ted Henderson on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 187 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Thomas P. Herzog on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 186 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Julie Smith Hogancamp on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 185 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Timothy E. Hoeft on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 184 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Kirby Holloway on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 183 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Leonard Houloose on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 182 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant J. Adam Edmund on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 181 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Blake Edwards on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 180 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Tad D. Eickman on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 179 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Wendy L. Elston on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 178 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Gary Eng on 12/27/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 177 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Mark L. Eurek on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 176 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Victor Faesser on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 175 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant D. Eugene Garner on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 174 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Shurie R. Graeve on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 173 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant James Gress on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 172 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Ted S. Griess on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 171 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant William Gumm on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 170 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Avery L. Gurnsey on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 169 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Millard Gustafson on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 168 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant John Haller on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 167 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Darrell Hamilton on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 166 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Rebecca R. Harling on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 165 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Steve Hapner on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 164 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Karl Dailey on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 163 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant David Derickson on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 162 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jeff Davis on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 161 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Larry D. Donner on 12/24/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 160 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Thomas Dow on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 159 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Patrick A. Duncan on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 158 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Timothy F. Dunning on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 157 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Rick Eberhardt on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 156 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant John Edens on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 155 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Tim Brouillette on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 154 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Sandra J. Allen on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 153 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jerry L. Archer on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 152 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Warren R. Arganbright on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 151 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Linda A. Bauer on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 150 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Chris Becker on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 149 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Ashley Boettcher on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 148 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Bradley Boyum on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 147 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant James D. Brueggman on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 146 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant William Brueggman on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 145 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Vernon Buckminster on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 144 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant William Burgess on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 143 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Thomas K. Casady on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 142 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Dean Chase on 12/28/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 141 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Melvin Christensen on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 140 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Ronald E. Colling on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 139 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Dale Crandall on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 138 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jill R. Cunningham on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 137 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Steven M. Curry on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 136 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Donna Fegler Daiss on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 135 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant David M. Streich on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 134 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Elizabeth F. Waterman on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 133 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Francis D. Botelho on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 132 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Nathan Cox on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 131 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant James L. Zimmerman on 12/23/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 130 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant George L. Hirschbach on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 129 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Douglas D. Palik on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 128 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Glenn Clark(County Attorneys (Valley)) on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 127 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant John Morgan on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 126 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Leland K. Miner on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 125 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Glenn Clark(County Attorneys (Blaine)) on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 124 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Arlan G. Wine on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 123 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Kim W. Watson on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 122 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Shawn R. Eatherton on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 121 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Donald W. Kleine on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 120 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Tami Schendt on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 119 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Michael Long on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 118 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Daniel A. Smith on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 117 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Julie L. Reiter on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 116 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Vern Hjorth on 12/29/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 115 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Thomas B. Donner on 12/21/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 114 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Vance Haug on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 113 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Willis Haynes on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 112 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant LeRoy W. Janssen on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 111 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Lee Polikov on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 110 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Harry J. Gillway on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 13, 2010 Filing 109 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Daniel L. Werner on 12/22/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 12, 2010 Filing 108 TEXT ORDER granting #107 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jeff Davis answer due 2/10/2010; Lee Polikov answer due 2/10/2010. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (GJG)
January 11, 2010 Filing 107 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead by Attorney Michael A. Smith on behalf of Defendants Jeff Davis, Lee Polikov.(Smith, Michael)
January 11, 2010 Filing 106 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting for full-time admission Attorney Kim Watson for Defendant Kim W. Watson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (TCL )
January 8, 2010 Filing 105 TEXT ORDER granting #104 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Timothy F. Dunning and Donald W. Kleine answers due 2/8/2010. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JAB)
January 8, 2010 Filing 104 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Attorney Timothy K. Dolan on behalf of Defendants Timothy F. Dunning, Donald W. Kleine.(Dolan, Timothy)
January 7, 2010 Filing 103 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jon Bruning on 12/18/2009; Nebraska State Patrol on 12/18/2009; State of Nebraska on 12/18/2009; Bryan Tuma on 12/18/2009. (Dornan, Stuart)
January 7, 2010 Filing 102 TEXT ORDER granting #99 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, and Bryan Tuma answer due 2/8/2010. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JAB)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - In 8:09CV456, the State of Nebraska filed a notice advising me that "duplicative actions [have been] filed in State Courts". I herewith request that the courts of the State of Nebraska refrain from issuing any orders enjoining Nebraska's Sex Offender Registration Act and related legislative bills while my cases are pending. I desperately hope to avoid a dispute with the state courts, but if push comes to shove and Nebraska files an appropriate motion, I may step in and enjoin state judges from taking any further action in these matters. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the State of Nebraska shall provide a copy of this memorandum and order to any state court judge considering whether to enjoin enforcement of the Nebraska Sex Offender Registration Act and LB 97 and LB 285. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
January 7, 2010 Filing 99 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.(Spohn, Katherine)
January 6, 2010 Filing 101 TEXT RECEIPT FOR CASH BOND in the amount of $ 500.00, receipt number 8-12328, posted by Dornan, Lustgarten Law Firm on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K per Memorandum and Order #92 . THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. A PDF DOCUMENT IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY. (TCL )
January 6, 2010 Filing 98 NOTICE of Duplicative Action and Litigation by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma (Spohn, Katherine)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding phone calls with Judges Arterburn and Burns. No substantive legal discussions were held between the aforementioned judges and me. I would characterize the calls from these judges as courtesy calls. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
January 4, 2010 Filing 96 NOTICE of Limited Participation by Attorney Richard C. Anderson on behalf of Defendant Thomas K. Casady (Anderson, Richard)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Counsel for Plaintiffs shall advise any state judge before whom they appear seeking similar relief to the relief sought here that I respectfully request that said judge grant no relief. Counsel shall provide the judge with a copy of this order. In addition to the normal electronic notice, the Clerks office shall call Plaintiffs' counsel and counsel for the State of Nebraska and advise them of this order. If a state court enters an order that conflicts with mine, there is high likelihood that I will take further more direct action to stop any such interference. In a spirit of comity and respect, I hope to avoid such an unseemly dispute by issuing this order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
December 30, 2009 Filing 94 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Julie Smith Hogancamp on behalf of Defendant Julie Smith Hogancamp.(TCL )
December 30, 2009 Filing 93 NOTICE of Limited Participation by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma (Spohn, Katherine)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion for a preliminary injunction (filing #4 ) is denied except as provided below: Defendants are preliminarily enjoined from enforcing the following statutes against persons who have been convicted of sex offenses but who have completed their criminal sentences and who are not on probation, parole, or court-ordered supervision, to wit: (1) Neb. Rev. Stat. 29-4006(2) (West, Operative January 1, 2010) (requiring consent to search and installation of monitoring hardware and software) and (2) Neb. Rev. Stat. 28-322.05 (West, Operative January 1, 2010) (making it a crime to use Internet social networking sites accessible by minors by a person required to register under the Sex Offender Registration Act). Within 10 days, Plaintiffs shall post a bond with the Clerk (cash or surety) in the sum of $500. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
December 29, 2009 Filing 91 NOTICE of Related Case by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma (Spohn, Katherine)
December 29, 2009 Filing 90 NOTICE OF LIMITED PARTICIPATION by Attorney Sandra J. Allen on behalf of Defendant John Zavadil (Allen, Sandra)
December 29, 2009 Filing 89 NOTICE OF LIMITED PARTICIPATION by Attorney Sandra J. Allen on behalf of Defendant Sandra J. Allen (Allen, Sandra)
December 29, 2009 Filing 88 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.(Cookson, David)
December 29, 2009 Filing 87 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Kim Watson has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL )
December 29, 2009 Filing 85 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Todd D. Wilson has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL )
December 29, 2009 Filing 84 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER #82 by Deputy Clerk. Pursuant to NECivR 7.0.2, a moving party shall submit a proposed order to the judge. Electronically submitted proposed orders may not be combined with the motion into one document. The proposed order should be e-mailed in a word-processing format to the assigned judge. This notice is for your information for future filings. (GJG)
December 28, 2009 Filing 86 NOTICE of Limited Participation by Attorney Kim Watson on behalf of Defendants James L. Wagner, Kim W. Watson (TCL )
December 28, 2009 Filing 83 NOTICE of Limited Participation by Attorney Todd D. Wilson on behalf of Defendants Dennis Ocken, Todd D. Wilson (TCL )
December 28, 2009 Filing 82 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cookson, David)
December 24, 2009 Filing 81 INDEX in support of Brief, #57 by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Cookson, David)
December 23, 2009 Filing 80 EXHIBIT LIST from preliminary injunction hearing held on 12/23/09. (CCB)
December 23, 2009 Filing 79 WITNESS LIST from preliminary injunction hearing held on 12/23/09. (CCB)
December 23, 2009 Filing 78 AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 12/23/2009 12:44:34 PM ]. File Size [ 15040 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:05:20 ]. (preliminary injunction hearing (afternoon session)). (auto-docket).
December 23, 2009 Filing 77 AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 12/23/2009 10:56:39 AM ]. File Size [ 6331 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:52:45 ]. (preliminary injunction hearing (morning session)). (auto-docket).
December 23, 2009 Filing 76 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Kopf in Lincoln on 12/23/09. Hearing held on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #4 . Court grants plaintiffs' motion #2 for leave to use fictitious names provided that plaintiffs' counsel attach declarations signed under the penalty of perjury. Defendants' oral motion in limine regarding the testimony of Lisa Sample is denied. Opening statements waived. Evidence and argument made by parties as to motion for preliminary injunction. Court takes matter under advisement and will have opinion the following week. Appearance for Plaintiffs: Stuart J. Dornan, Thomas J. Monaghan, Blake Richards; Defendants State of Nebraska, Nebraska State Patrol, Jon Bruning, Col. Bryan Tuma: David D. Cookson and Katherine J. Spohn; for Defendants Douglas County Attorney and Douglas County Sheriff: Timothy K. Dolan and Jeffrey J. Lux; Courtroom Deputy: Colleen Beran; Court Reporter: Digital; Time Commenced: 11:06 a.m. - 12:00 p.m. Time Concluded: 1:09 p.m. - 3:10 p.m. (CCB)
December 23, 2009 Filing 75 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting for full-time admission Attorney Corey M. O'Brien for Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (GJG)
December 23, 2009 Filing 74 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Julie Smith Hogancamp has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL )
December 23, 2009 Filing 73 TEXT NOTICE OF INDEX OF EVIDENCE regarding brief filing #57 , by Deputy Clerk. Pursuant to NECivR 7.0.1(a)(2) and (b)(2), evidence in support of a motion or brief shall be identified on an electronically-filed index of evidence. The index of evidence must identify the motion or brief to which it relates. This notice is for your information for future filings. TEXT NOTICE OF INCORRECT EVENT used when filing the Affidavits filings #59 #60 #61 #62 #63 #64 #65 and #66 as they are attachments to the Index filing #58 . In the future, use the event ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED.(GJG)
December 23, 2009 Filing 71 MOTION Use of fictitious names by Attorney Lawrence G. Whelan on behalf of Intervenor John Doe 21-23.(Whelan, Lawrence)
December 23, 2009 Filing 70 MOTION to Intervene by Attorney Lawrence G. Whelan on behalf of Intervenor John Doe 21-23.(Whelan, Lawrence)
December 23, 2009 Filing 69 NOTICE of Limited Participation by Attorney Michael E. Thew on behalf of Defendants Gary Lacey, Terry Wagner (Thew, Michael)
December 23, 2009 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Katherine J. Spohn on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma (Spohn, Katherine)
December 23, 2009 Filing 67 NOTICE of Limited Participation by County Officials by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma (Cookson, David)
December 23, 2009 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT of Nicole Wambold regarding Index #58 by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.(Cookson, David)
December 23, 2009 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT of Ernie Allen, President and Chief Executive Office of the National Center for Missing and Exploited Children regarding Index #58 by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a, #2 Exhibit 1b)(Cookson, David)
December 23, 2009 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Kerry Crosby, Investigator, Attorney General's Office regarding Index #58 by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.(Cookson, David)
December 23, 2009 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT of Ed Sexton, Investigator, Attorney General's Office regarding Index #58 by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.(Cookson, David)
December 23, 2009 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT of Leslie Levy, Assistant Attorney General regarding Index #58 by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.(Cookson, David)
December 23, 2009 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of Glen Elwell, Nebraska State Patrol regarding Index #58 by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.(Cookson, David)
December 23, 2009 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT of Shawn Edwards, Nebraska State Patrol regarding Index #58 by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a, #2 Exhibit 1b, #3 Exhibit 2a, #4 Exhibit 2b)(Cookson, David)
December 23, 2009 Filing 59 AFFIDAVIT of David D. Cookson, Chief Deputy Attorney General regarding Index #58 by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cookson, David)
December 23, 2009 Filing 58 INDEX of Evidence in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.(Cookson, David)
December 23, 2009 Filing 57 BRIEF in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2)(Cookson, David)
December 22, 2009 Filing 72 NOTICE of Limited Participation by Attorney Julie Smith Hogancamp on behalf of Defendants Julie Smith Hogancamp, James P. Wenzl (TCL)
December 22, 2009 Filing 56 NOTICE regarding Order,,,,,, #40 Notice of Sections Challenged by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K (Dornan, Stuart)
December 22, 2009 Filing 55 BRIEF in support of OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS INDEX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE FICTITIOUS NAMES AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.(Cookson, David)
December 22, 2009 Filing 54 OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS INDEX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE FICTITIOUS NAMES AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.(Cookson, David)
December 22, 2009 Filing 53 BRIEF in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Use Fictitious Names by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma.(Cookson, David)
December 22, 2009 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Defendants Donald W. Kleine and Timothy F. Dunning on behalf of Jeffrey J. Lux and Timothy K. Dolan by Attorney Timothy K. Dolan on behalf of Defendants Timothy F. Dunning, Donald W. Kleine (Dolan, Timothy)
December 22, 2009 Filing 51 INDEX in support of Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Brief #5 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 (Supplemental) by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #39: Curriculum Vitae of Lisa Sample, #2 Exhibit #40: Article, Are Sex Offenders Different?, #3 Exhibit #41: Article, An Examination of the Degree to Which Sex Offenders Kill)(Dornan, Stuart)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - To help the lawyers prepare for the preliminary injunction hearing, Counsel shall be prepared to explain in what manner Nebraska's new laws differ, if at all, from the requirements of the Sex Offender Registration and Notification Act (SORNA), 42 U.S.C. 16901- 16991. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall be prepared to represent whether at least some of the plaintiffs who have been convicted of sexual offenses have served their time and are no longer on probation or parole. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
December 21, 2009 Filing 49 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant James J. McNally. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL )
December 21, 2009 Filing 45 Summons Requested as to James McNally regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #4 filed by John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. To assist counsel as they prepare their arguments for the preliminary injunction hearing, counsel shall give extra attention to the "consent to search" requirement for former offenders who are not on probation or parole. In particular, counsel shall read and be familiar with Doe v. Prosecutor, Marian County, 566 F. Supp.2nd 862 (S.D. Ind. 2008) (granting injunction in favor of former offenders that were not on probation or parole; holding that: (1) consent requirement under statute was not voluntary; (2) scope of search provided for by statute was unconstitutional; and (3) special needs exception did not justify warrantless searches under the statute). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
December 18, 2009 Filing 48 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Joseph M. Smith. (TCL )
December 18, 2009 Filing 47 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Jerry L. Archer, Chris Becker, Bradley Boyum, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Karl Dailey, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas Dow, Timothy F. Dunning, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, Gary Eng, Jeff Franklin, Harry J. Gillway, James Gress, William Gumm, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Steve Hespen, Vern Hjorth, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hurlburt, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Dwaine W. Ladwig, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Adrian Lindsey, Brent Lottman, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Robert S. McBride, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, Robert Pickell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Terry Robbins, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Harold Schenck, Troy Schmitz, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, Michael Unger, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Jerry Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Scott K. White, Joe Yocum, John Zavadil. (TCL )
December 18, 2009 Filing 46 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Sandra J. Allen, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Ashley Boettcher, Tim Brouillette, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Patrick A. Duncan, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, D. Eugene Garner, Shurie R. Graeve, Ted S. Griess, Avery L. Gurnsey, Rebecca R. Harling, Thomas P. Herzog, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kathleen J. Hutchinson, Dennis King, Gary Lacey, W. Bert Lammli, Louie M. Ligouri, Verlyn Luebbe, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Jerry McDole, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, A. James Moravek, James D. Owens, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Richard H. Roberts, Paul B. Schaub, Timothy S. Schmidt, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott(County Attorneys (Keya Paha)), Eric Scott(County Attorneys (Cherry)), Tim Sieh, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, Tiffany Wasserburger, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Mark Young. (TCL ) Modified on 12/21/2009 to remove text(TCL ).
December 18, 2009 Filing 43 Summons Requested as to Joseph Smith regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 18, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney David D. Cookson on behalf of Defendants Jon Bruning, Nebraska State Patrol, State of Nebraska, Bryan Tuma (Cookson, David)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER - Regarding Lincoln Magistrate Docket. Pursuant to the retirement of Magistrate Judge David L. Piester on August 1, 2009, all civil and criminal cases previously assigned to Judge Piester are reassigned to District Judge Richard G. Kopf. Judge Kopf will handle pretrial management in new civil and criminal cases assigned to Judges Kopf and Urbom in accordance with NEGenR 1.4(a)(2) and NECivR 72.1 until a new magistrate judge is appointed. Ordered by Judge Joseph F Bataillon. (Copies mailed)(MKR) Modified on 12/30/2009 to correct judge(MKR).
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. After consultation with counsel, IT IS ORDERED that:(1)Counsel for the plaintiffs shall promptly file a notice specifying the particular sections of the legislative bills that are being attacked, including a specification of where those sections are codified. (2)Counsel for the plaintiffs, Mr. Dornan, has represented that to the best of his knowledge none of the plaintiffs are currently the subject of a criminal prosecution or a probation revocation dispute. Mr. Dornan shall be prepared to confirm this representation on December 23, 2009, at the commencement of the hearing described below. (3)A hearing on a preliminary injunction in this case will commence at 11:00 a.m. on Wednesday, December 23, 2009, recess at noon, start again at 1:00 p.m., and adjourn at 5:00 p.m. that day. Without a lunch break, the hearing will commence again at 8:00 a.m. on December 24, 2009, and conclude at 1:00 p.m. During these two days, each side will be given approximately four hours to present their evidence. Evidence may be presented by affidavit or otherwise. Following the presentation of evidence, each side will be given a total of one hour to make their oral argument, with oral argument commencing at approximately 11:00 a.m. Defendants shall confer among themselves and come to an agreement regarding the allocation of evidence and argument time. The defendants may submit one or more responsive briefs at any time between now and the commencement of the hearing on the preliminary injunction. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
December 18, 2009 Filing 39 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Blake Richards has not registered for admittance to practice registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (Copy mailed) (MKR)
December 17, 2009 Filing 38 Summons Issued as to defendant Francis D. Botelho, Jon Bruning, Glenn Clark(County Attorneys (Blaine)), Nathan Cox, Donna Fegler Daiss, Thomas B. Donner, Shawn R. Eatherton, Vance Haug, George L. Hirschbach, Donald W. Kleine, Michael Long, Leland K. Miner, John Morgan, Nebraska State Patrol, Douglas D. Palik, Julie L. Reiter, Richard Roberts, Tami Schendt, Daniel A. Smith, State of Nebraska, David M. Streich, Bryan Tuma, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Kim W. Watson, Arlan G. Wine, James L. Zimmerman regarding YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL )
December 17, 2009 Filing 37 Summons Requested as to Adrian Lindsey, Alan Moore, Alex Hayes, Anthony McPhillips, Ben Matchett, Bill Simpson, Bradley Boyum, Brent Lottman, Bryan Leggott, Casey D. Hurlburt, Chris Becker, Chris Kleinberg, Dale Radcliff, Daniel Rupp, Darrell Hamilton, Darrell Johnson, David Derickson, David Lee, David Spiegel, David C. Weeks, Davis Moore, Dean Chase, Dennis Ocken, Donald Klug, Doug Miller, Dwaine Ladwig, Gary Eng, Gary Reiber, Gene Mahon, Greg Magee, Harold Schenck, Harry J. Gillway, James D. Bruggeman, James Gress, James Janecek, James L. Wagner, James R. Marr, James Wenzl, Jayme Reed, Jeff Davis, Jeff Franklin, Jeff Kirsch, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, Jerome Kramer, Jerry L. Archer, Jerry Watson, Jim K. Lawson, Joe Yocum, John Edens, John Haller, John Zavadil, Karl Dailey, Kevin Mueller, Kevin Stukenholtz, Kirby Holloway, Kirk Handrup, Kurt Kapperman, Larry D. Donner, Larry Koranda, Leonard Houloose, LeRoy W. Janssen, Lester Johnson, Lynn Nichols, Mark Hecker, Melvin Christiansen, Michael Janulewicz, Michael Robinson, Michael Unger, Millard Gustafson, Neil Miller, Nels Sorenson, Patrick McNeil, K. Patrick Mooney, Paul Kruse, Rick Eberhardt, Robert S. McBride, Robert Pickell, Ron Murtaugh, Scott K. White, Shawn Hebbert, Steve Harper, Steve Hepson, Tammy Mowry, Ted Henderson, Terry Robbins, Terry Wagner, Thomas Dow, Thomas K. Casady, Tim Sierks, Timothy F. Dunning, Timothy S. Mullen, Timothy Sutherland, Tom Nutt, Troy Schmitz, Vern Hjorth, Vernon Buckminster, William Bruggeman, William Burgess, William Gumm, William Roe and Willis Haynes regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 36 Summons Requested as to Ashley Boettcher, Eric Scott (Keya Paha County Attorney), Eric Scott (Cherry County Attorney), James D. Owens, Jill Cunningham, Kathleen Hutchinson, Paul Schaub, Paul Vaughn, Ted Griess, Patrick Duncan, Bryan McQuay, J. Blake Edwards, Jon Schroeder, Michael Powell, D. Eugene Garner, David Wilson, Gary Lacey, Joel Phillips, John Thomas, Philip Pierce, Randall Ritnour, Thomas Herzog, Tom Patterson, Dale Crandall, David T. Schroeder, George Vinton, A. James Moravek, James Swanson, Jason White, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Linda Bauer, Rebecca R. Harling, Steve Vinton, Todd Wilson, J. Adam Edmund, Avery Gurnsey, W. Bert Lammli, Daniel Werner, David Partsch, David Wondra, Dennis King, Douglas Merz, Jean Rhodes, Lee Polikov, Louie Ligouri, Mark Eurek, Mark Young, Paul Wood, Rodney Wetovick, Ronald Colling, Sandra J. Allen, Steve Curry, Tad Eickman, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Tim Brouillette, Timothy Schmidt, Victor Faesser, Warren Arganbright, Glenn Clark, James McNally, Jerry McDole, Michael Pieper, Richard Roberts, Scott Tinglehoff, Schurie Graeve, Tiffany Wasserburger, Tim Sieh, Timothy Hoeft, Verlyn Luebbe and Wendy Elston regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 35 Summons Requested as to John Morgan regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 34 Summons Requested as to Leland Miner regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 33 Summons Requested as to Arlan Wine regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 32 Summons Requested as to Glenn Clark regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 31 Summons Requested as to Douglas Palik regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 30 Summons Requested as to George Hirschbach regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 29 Summons Requested as to James Zimmerman regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 28 Summons Requested as to Vance Haug regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 27 Summons Requested as to Nathan Cox regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 26 Summons Requested as to Richard Roberts regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 25 Summons Requested as to Kim W. Watson regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 24 Summons Requested as to Julie L. Reiter regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 23 Summons Requested as to Michael Long regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 22 Summons Requested as to Tami Schendt regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 21 Summons Requested as to Daniel Smith regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 20 Summons Requested as to Donna Fegler Daiss regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 19 Summons Requested as to Tom Donner regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 18 Summons Requested as to Shawn Eatherton regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 17 Summons Requested as to Elizabeth F. Waterman regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 16 Summons Requested as to Francis D. Botelho regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 15 Summons Requested as to David Streitch regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 14 Summons Requested as to Donald W. Kleine regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 13 Summons Requested as to State of Nebraska regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 12 Summons Requested as to Col. Bryan Tuma regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 11 Summons Requested as to Nebraska State Patrol regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Jon Bruning regarding Index,,,, #6 , Brief #3 , Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #2 , Brief #5 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 , Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Affidavit #7 . (Dornan, Stuart)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. It is ordered that counsel for the plaintiffs shall immediately contact the Attorney General for the State of Nebraska or one of his deputies and then those lawyers shall call my judicial assistant (Kris Leininger at 402-437-1640) today or tomorrow to schedule a telephone conference with me. My judicial assistant is directed to call the plaintiffs' counsel and advise him of this order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
December 17, 2009 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Richard G. Kopf and Richard G. Kopf (REFERRAL JUDGE) assigned. (TCL )
December 16, 2009 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Preliminary Injunction regarding Index,,,, #6 by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.(Dornan, Stuart)
December 16, 2009 Filing 6 INDEX in support of Brief #5 , Brief #3 in Support of Motion for Leave to Use Fictitious Names and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20: Declarations of Does 1-20, #2 Exhibit 21: Affidavit of Doe A, #3 Exhibit 22: Declaration of Doe B, #4 Exhibit 23: Affidavit of Doe C, #5 Exhibit 24: Affidavit of Doe D, #6 Exhibit 25: Affidavit of Doe E, #7 Exhibit 26: Affidavit of Doe F, #8 Exhibit 27: Affidavit of Doe G, #9 Exhibit 28: Affidavit of Doe H, #10 Exhibit 29: Affidavit of Doe I, #11 Exhibit 30: Affidavit of Doe J, #12 Exhibit 31: Affidavit of Doe K, #13 Exhibit 32: Letter from State Patrol, #14 Exhibit 33: Consent to Search Under Nebraska Sex Offender Registry Act, #15 Exhibit 34: Nebraska Sex Offender Risk Assessments, #16 Exhibit 35: Lexington Clipper Herald, #17 Exhibit 36: Nebraska State Patrol website, #18 Exhibit 37: Nebraska State Patrol website, #19 Exhibit 38: WOWT.com)(Dornan, Stuart)
December 16, 2009 Filing 5 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #4 by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.(Dornan, Stuart)
December 16, 2009 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.(Dornan, Stuart)
December 16, 2009 Filing 3 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Leave to Use Fictitious Names #2 by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.(Dornan, Stuart)
December 16, 2009 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Use Fictitious Names by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K.(Dornan, Stuart)
December 16, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sandra J. Allen, Jerry L. Archer, Warren R. Arganbright, Linda A. Bauer, Chris Becker, Ashley Boettcher, Francis Botelho, Bradley Boyum, Tim Brouillette, James D. Brueggman, William Brueggman, Jon Bruning, Vernon Buckminster, William Burgess, Thomas K. Casady, Dean Chase, Melvin Christensen, Glenn Clark, Glenn Clark, Ronald E. Colling, Nathan Cox, Dale Crandall, Jill R. Cunningham, Steven M. Curry, Karl Dailey, Donna Daiss, Jeff Davis, David Derickson, Larry D. Donner, Thomas Donner, Thomas Dow, Patrick A. Duncan, Timothy F. Dunning, Shawn R. Eatherton, Rick Eberhardt, John Edens, J. Adam Edmund, Blake Edwards, Tad D. Eickman, Wendy L. Elston, Gary Eng, Mark L. Eurek, Victor Faesser, Jeff Franklin, D. Eugene Garner, Harry J. Gillway, Shurie R. Graeve, James Gress, Ted S. Griess, William Gumm, Avery L. Gurnsey, Millard Gustafson, John Haller, Darrell Hamilton, Kirk W. Handrup, Steve Hapner, Rebecca R. Harling, Vance Haug, Alex Hayes, Willis Haynes, Shawn Hebbert, Mark Hecker, Ted Henderson, Thomas P. Herzog, Steve Hespen, George Hirschbach, Vern Hjorth, Timothy E. Hoeft, Julie Smith Hogancamp, Kirby Holloway, Leonard Houloose, Casey D. Hulburt, Kathleen Hutchinson, James F. Janecek, LeRoy W. Janssen, Michael F. Janulewicz, Darrell Johnson, Lester E. Johnson, Kurt Kapperman, Dennis King, Jeff Kirsch, Chris Kleinberg, Donald W. Kleine, Donald Klug, Larry Koranda, Jerome Kramer, Paul J. Kruse, Gary Lacey, Dwaine W. Ladwig, W. Bert Lammli, Jim K. Lawson, David Lee, Bryan Leggott, Louie M. Ligouri, Adrian Lindsey, Michael Long, Brent Lottman, Verlyn Luebbe, Greg Magee, Gene Mahon, James R. Marr, Ben Matchett, Tammy Maul-Bodlak, Robert S. McBride, Jerry McDole, James J. McNally, Patrick McNeil, Anthony McPhillips, Bryan S. McQuay, Douglas E. Merz, Doug Miller, Neil A. Miller, Leland K. Miner, K. Patrick Mooney, Alan Moore, Davis Moore, A. James Moravek, John Morgan, Tammy Mowry, Kevin Mueller, Timothy S. Mullen, Ron Murtaugh, Nebraska State Patrol, Lynn Nichols, Tom Nutt, Dennis Ocken, Jeffrey S. Ortgies, James D. Owens, Douglas D. Palik, David J. Partsch, Tom Patterson, Joel W. Phillips, Robert Pickell, Michael E. Pieper, Philip E. Pierce, Lee Polikov, Michael H. Powell, Dale Radcliff, Jayme Reed, Gary Reiber, Julie Reiter, Jean Rhodes, Randall Ritnour, Terry Robbins, Richard H. Roberts, Richard Roberts, Michael Robinson, William Roe, Daniel Rupp, Paul Schaub, Harold Schenck, Tami Schendt, Timothy S. Schmidt, Troy Schmitz, David T. Schroeder, Jon S. Schroeder, Eric Scott, Tim Sieh, Tim Sierks, Bill Simpson, Daniel A. Smith, Joseph M. Smith, Nels Sorensen, David Spiegel, State of Nebraska, David Streich, Kevin Stukenholtz, Timothy Sutherland, James Swanson, John Thomas, Scott J. Tingelhoff, Bryan Tuma, Michael Unger, Paul J. Vaughan, George G. Vinton, Steve Vinton, James L. Wagner, Terry Wagner, Tiffany Wasserburger, Elizabeth F. Waterman, Jerry Watson, Kim W. Watson, David C. Weeks, James P. Wenzl, Daniel L. Werner, Rodney Wetovick, Jason White, Scott K. White, David L. Wilson, Todd D. Wilson, Arlan G. Wine, David G. Wondra, Paul Wood, Joe Yocum, Mark Young, John Zavadil, James Zimmerman ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0867-1673404), by Attorney Stuart J. Dornan on behalf of John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20, John Doe and Jane Doe A through K(Dornan, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Doe and Jane Doe 1 through 20 et al v. State of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millard Gustafson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Corey M. O'Brien
Represented By: David D. Cookson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska State Patrol
Represented By: Corey M. O'Brien
Represented By: David D. Cookson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Bruning
Represented By: Corey M. O'Brien
Represented By: David D. Cookson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Col. Bryan Tuma
Represented By: Corey M. O'Brien
Represented By: David D. Cookson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Fegler Daiss
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Long
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roberts
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Zimmerman
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Clark
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morgan
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen J. Hutchinson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Boettcher
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Streich
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn R. Eatherton
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A. Smith
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie L. Reiter
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Cox
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George L. Hirschbach
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlan G. Wine
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Scott
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul B. Schaub
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted S. Griess
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis D. Botelho
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B. Donner
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tami Schendt
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim W. Watson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Kimberly M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance Haug
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth F. Waterman
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas D. Palik
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland K. Miner
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Vaughan
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W. Kleine
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lux
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Owens
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill R. Cunningham
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick A. Duncan
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon S. Schroeder
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Patterson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Ritnour
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip E. Pierce
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Crandall
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd D. Wilson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Todd D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. James Moravek
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Swanson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Young
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael H. Powell
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan S. McQuay
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel W. Phillips
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Eugene Garner
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. Herzog
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George G. Vinton
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David T. Schroeder
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda A. Bauer
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Smith Hogancamp
Represented By: Julie Smith Hogancamp
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Wondra
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Edwards
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Wilson
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thomas
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Lacey
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Michael E. Thew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca R. Harling
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Vinton
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason White
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Smith
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Brouillette
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Curry
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Rhodes
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Wetovick
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louie M. Ligouri
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy S. Schmidt
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Partsch
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Faesser
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H. Roberts
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy E. Hoeft
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verlyn Luebbe
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra J. Allen
Represented By: Carl K. Hart, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Sandra J. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald E. Colling
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Wood
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas E. Merz
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery L. Gurnsey
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tad D. Eickman
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Polikov
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Michael A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J. Tingelhoff
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Wasserburger
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy L. Elston
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis King
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark L. Eurek
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Adam Edmund
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Bert Lammli
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel L. Werner
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren R. Arganbright
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Maul-Bodlak
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shurie R. Graeve
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Pieper
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry McDole
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. McNally
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Sieh
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Stree