IN RE: PLAVIX PRODUCT LIABILITY AND MARKETING LITIGATION
Plaintiff: Boyce Glenn, MYRNA PETERS, ROSE JOSEPH, JOSEPH F. MEGLINO, SR., PEGGY R. KENNEDY, LOUIS PISANO, Rhoden A. Fitzroy, ROSEMARIE LOWE, John C. Taylor, Vernon Medlock, Larry E. Ingram, Sr., GAIL M. SLAGLE, ELIZABETH ABNEY, JENNIFER ASAD, HELEN NICHOLAS, LISA BRADFORD, Henry Levi West, FLOYD HATTON, MAUREEN J PATT, LEAH STRAIGHT, CHESTER L. BIRT, James Rickie Mitchell, THOMAS COLEMAN, Evelyn L. Gillespie, Juanita Kilgore, Eve Daniels, Ricky Pope, RALPH T. HARDEN, THEODORE R. JIMENEZ, DEBORAH PARTAIN, VICKI L. WALLACE, PHYLLIS OSWIECINSKI, EDDIE BARKSDALE, Stephen Kastor, GENEVA K. BELLINGER, Kathleen Boardley, PEARL C. HARVEY, THOMAS STASIAK, DIANE SMITH, JULIE RASBAND, Yoland Stafford, Kathaleen Jones, CATHY SCIARA, Judy A. Skorik, ANNA J. TINGLEY, Donna Lewis, Cynthia Walker, JOHNNY L. JOHNSON, GLENNA BAYS, RALPH LANDOLFI, SR., Daniel Craig, HELEN VIGIL, Donald Dade, MICHAEL FARMER, Margaret F. Reynolds, Bertha Ann Smith, NORMA RAGSDALE, GILBERT ORTIZ, SRINIVASAN DURAIRAJ, ESTATE OF ARTHENA REDDEN, Wayne D. Sain, David Wylie, CLARENCE A. BELVINS, CHARLES WRIGHT, WILLIE PRESLEY, DAVID STOKES, Steve A. Panas, BERNADETTE J. BENSON, JOHN JACOBS, PATRICIA CASALE, ALBERT DENNISON, Sidney Christian, Jerry Blocker, Raymond M. Tandle, Joseph Miller, Carolyn Laprad, MARY HALBERT, LAWRENCE WALKER, ALFRED T. BOUTWELL, PATRICIA GNEWUCH, Donald A. Wiatrowski, BARRY GORREVICH, Terri Snyder Jackson, LARRY C. HUDNALL, Gregg Mace, JOSEPH F. KANE, SIDNEY SCHNELL, JUDITH PFEIFFER, BETTY L. BRADBERRY, ROBERT J PATT, Patricia Coy, JULIE MAE BOYD, SHARON LECOUMPTE, RONALD BURCH, Robert Osborne, LISA M. MCLAUGHLIN, ALLEN BROWN, Ron Feiman, Helen Sowers, RUTH LOYD, Linda M. Knight, STEVE CANNON, GILBERT PARKER, LONNIE D. MCGUIRE, DELON HALL, William J. Oberacker, Gary Hand, FRANK MORMUR, Betty L. Bannister, LOIS WILLIAMS, JOHN W. THARP, CAROLINE S. ZERBE, MODESTO ROQUE, ROBERT H. HUMPHREYS, CATHY I. SCHACKEL, STATE OF MINNESOTA, Brian Keith, JOYCE PHILLIPS, DAVID RIPPER, OSCAR NATALE, KAREN GARCIA, Sandra McInnis, DARRELL HUNSAKER, David M. Mintzer, Lucinda Frangiamore, Bridget Dinvaut, RAE ROGERS, Addie P. Corley, PAT VANRANDALL, MADELINE F. GOLDSTEIN, DEAN L. GUTTERIDGE, PAMELA WILLIAMS, Sylvester Collie, STATE OF WISCONSIN, Myra Jones, LEON TACKETT, JULIA M. KIMBERLY, Pam Carter, HERBERT R. GRAY, EZRA K. CASSIDY, Dan Myers, DAVID R. HOWTON, Johnny K. Freeman, SAM REED, Mary Emigh, Louis Cayia, Betty N. Jackson, BETTY MORETTO, KELLY J. DUPREE, JEANNETTE IRBY, JACK W. MAYS, James . Mitchell, Velma Rogers, SANDRA K. KORANEK, MICHAEL A. GASPERI, Jeanne Jones, LATANYA KING, ALEX BROWN, CHARLOTTE MORRIS, FRIEDA PIERCY, GEORGE NOSSEK, ROBERT WEAVER, Walter Lee Wooten, STANLEY FORTE, NELLIE YOUNGBLOOD, William Pollock, Ruth Coffey, ROSIE HALL, CLYDE E WORKMAN, FRANCES HILTNER, Arthur Ziegler, Cannatella Rosie, Delma Taylor, Leeiller Smith, VERNON C. MOORE, Keith Marshall, BARBARA KENNEDY, Wilbur M. Jones, FLORENCE BOYCE, BEVERLY E. BURRELL, ROLAND MODLIN, CHARLES HENDERSON, RUBY BRYANT, Kenneth Evans, BETTY SUE LEE, ESTATE OF NORMAN G. ELLIS, DECEASED, JOHN NORMAN, ZENIADA F. HARRIS, BARBARA A. KRAKLIO, Eleanor F. Brown, Donald F. Rathgaber, PATRICK MCCORMICK, DEROTHA LITTLE, LANNY S. SHANE, Angras Hogg, LAURIE JAKUBOWSKI, James Radke, YVONNE P EMMETT, BELINDA JOHNSON, WILLIAM TOLAND, ESTATE OF TED DOVER, DECEASED, MICHAEL F. SCHACKEL, Sharon A. Melton, VANESSA L. CUMBER, Lindie Hendrix, Carl Stamper, LOLAND WEAVER, Myra S. Moglowski, ROBERT E. BARLAGE, JAISREE REANGARAJAN, VICKIE BEEBE, MULDROW WEBB, Jeanette George, FRANCIS PULEO, Janice Curry, MARIJON PARTLOW, SARAH F. BROWN, Viola Edith Cowles, Hershel Hawley, ANGELA M. MARPLES, JERRY CARR, Anne Beasley, Doris Burns, RONALD F. SWANSON, D. SUZETTE WARREN, John Parmegiani, LEE B. SHAW, ANNA ANDERSON, WALTRIEL S. CRUM, PHYLLIS CASEY, PEGGY TODD, Joyce Layne, Beth H. Robertson, JANET DICRISTINO, LEROY TURCHIN, BONNIE LAUTERS, MARIA SAMUDIO, LOYCE FISHER, Leona Byrd, JUANITA LANDRUM, Lucius McCain, JOSEPH TERRY, MYLES CARTER, RAYLIN PISANO, JUDITH SMITH, WILLIAM J. DESTEFANO, WILLIE PLUMMER, Roger Dove, Beatrice Mills, ARTHUR PETRONIO, Mary D Oliver, CLARENCE DREW, Lacey Holton, Theresa Simonds, ANNIE JOHNSON, DANIEL KLINK, DENISE M. HADDAD, JACKIE MORTICHESKY, ROD BOYER, ANTHONY DESIMONE, Eugene W. Seagle, JANET R. JACKSON, Shirley A. Mothersbaugh, HELEN YUAN, GLENDA BOWERS, Pearlie Sykes, CAROL ROBERTSON, Dawari Dan-Harry, Marsha Crews, PAUL M. COLLINS, MARY REGIER, CAROL A FROST, DAVID G. LINDENMUTH, DARRIA BROWN, ROGER C. STAFFORD, Martha Bonesteel, WILLIAM COLLINS, MARY F. BAILEY, William M. Taylor, J. C. CONNER, Keith Woodson, JACQUELINE HYMAN, Cecilia D. Box, LARRY NOBLE, Joseph Caraco, RUBY VANN, WILLIAM GEMMILL, IVORY WILLIAMS, MILTON R BRADSHAW, WILLIAM HARDIN, KAREN V. WILLIAMS, GAIL S BISHOP, DONNA M. SHORT, DEBRA IZZO, THE STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, SAMUEL L. TINGLER, ANNIE ADAMS, THE STATE OF MINNESOTA, CAROLYN SMITH, STEVEN D. MARTINEZ, TINA R. SMITH, WILLIAM D. WOMACK, DORIS OLSON, Tommy Ketcham, GERALDINE KEETON, CAROLYN HOOKER, TALSIE NEAL, NEIL ALFORD, Lavette Sherod Jacobs, PATRICIA A. HOLLIMON, JOYCE A. GOGLEY, Peggy Sue Boatright, BRENDA J. HOWARD, ROBERT T ENSLEY, GARY THOMPSON, MARIA K. MCCORMACK, Jackie L. Esteppe, NEIL REDDINGTON, ALLAN D. JARED, JAMES BLOCKER, JOSEPH S. VANBLERCK, LAMAR WILLIAMS, ARTHUR H. BURSEY, MANDA WILLIAMS, Glenda Wilcox, Mary Rodel, THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Robert Hendrix, GERTESTINE MCFERSON, RICHARD C. HUEBNER, Katherine Sell, CONSUELO LIGHTNER, BARBARA WARREN, Robert P. Tabellion, Dorothy Waddell, Timothy L. Robertson, Sandra Desmond, FREDA PITTS, SUSAN WILLIAMS, William J. Marshall, Sr., Michael A. Stevenson, Gerald L. Rounds, Carla Williams, Tina Howell, GERROLD PARRISH, Terry T. Martin, HEIDI CREAMER, Patricia Pinckley, Betty Richardson, EDITH DOBERSTEIN, WILLIAM MUTCHER, LAWRENCE THOMPSON, Eugene Russell, DOREEN A. LICAYAN, TRACY BUTCHER, Sallie Connor, Kathleen E. Selig, Lucy C. Caraco, EUGENE P. MICHAEL, RHONDA F. MAULDIN, LUTHER E. JOHNSON, Richard Warner, MARY D. YORK, CHERYL MILLS, JOHN VEST, Marilyn Jones, MAE QUINN, RUBY SANDERS, DARNELLA ABRAMS, GREGORY GILHOOLEY, Dianna E. Russell, FLORA BECKER, Sammy Retton, Ione Rose Marshall, DORA THOMAS, SUSIE FARMER, VICY BRAGALONE, SARA MAYDEN, DONALD R. TROTTER, THOMAS VELINSKIE, DAVID EDINBURGH, WILLIAM C. WASHBURN, Jamie McGuire, ANNA SAUERWINE, LESA SCIONEAUX, LYNETTE HAWKINS, GEORGE V. LOCKWOOD, JR., JAMES E. LYTLE, FRANCIS JONES, ROLLIE V. BORCHARDT, HOWARD L. BURT, Alfonzo Correale, DENISE SABIN, STATE OF HAWAII, CHERYL FLOYD, LYNN FAYE BANKS, Dorothy D. Gibson, RANDALL SAMPLES, LORI BREDA, CEASAR CABRERA, III, Robert A. Hanson, ARNOLA A. PIZZIO, GEORGE F BISHOP, Barrie Mason, SANDRA HOWARD, Mary A. Reitz, CONSOLATION SHAFFER, DOROTHY ACETI, JAMES D. ROSE, John Petticrew, BETH JOHNSON, PAUN ALBU, DONALD J PARKIN, JOHN KLOTZ, JONATHAN RICH, ROSS W. TARR, ANGELA WHEELER, LINDA L. GIBSON, JOSEPH MALANCONE, ANNA GULLETTE, JAMES J. KEY, JEROME SACHS, Joan Curi, Bula Daw, LINDA D. DELPIANO, JAMES MAHL, MARY E. MARTIN, William Colbert, Markiva Grant, Jackie Brown, Jake Tyre, KATHRYN KAPPLER, James Desmond, AUDREY C. MATTHEW, PEGGY A. JONES, Jack Stanley, BONNIE R. O'NEAL, Wanda L. Ellis, SHIRLEY ESTER, DONNA FUTRELL, NELVA MCILWAIN, Andres Betanzos, VALEESA JOHNSON, Ila Jordan, Arnold R. Knight, Melody A. McFarland, LILLIAN MITCHELL, DONALD NELSON, DONNA M. YARBOROUGH, ROBERT J. FENT, Rose Costello, Ralph Giglio, MIKE TRIMOBLI, Kenneth E. Daw, Jacqueline Earl, VIRGINIA LOCKHART, TRACI PHIPPS, AGNES BALDWIN, JESSE COOK, Harriet Blye, WILLIAM M. HOLLOWAY, Willie D. Pinckley, KENNETH ANDRUS, ALICE AARON, DENNY L. ESTES, Sheron Cavanaugh, Mary L. Cauthen, THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, MICHAEL D. CALANDRA, John E. Hrisak, KAREN L. LIPSKY, Nettie Long, MICHELE PIEL, WANDA WILLIAMS, MARIA GARZA, LISA DAY, LORRAINE DVORAK, EDWIN L KUNTZ, Ronald Rembert, Jr., IVEN B. ROBINSON, GUADALUPE YBARRA, LAURA MEYER, Charles Sims, MICHAEL CLEVENGER, TERRI L. WEIR, George Marcin, JAMES F. DEMUNNO, JOHN E. HANNAN, DAVID W. WEAVER, SYLVIA SEAWRIGHT, MARIA DIAZ, Edwin Human, LONNIE BARRINGER, Donald Ray Begley, MISTY MICHELLE BERRYHILL, RONALD SCHULTZ, Louis Dennis, Jr., DOROTHY J. SMITH, DOMINICK IMBIMBO, RONALD JACKSON, BRUCE RONEY, Antonio M. Hall, MARY CARDWELL, SHERRY A. RAY, Richard S. Maged, RALPH IZZO, JEFFREY D. HALE, RAYMOND D. SMITH, RILLA BOWLES, FREDERICK RADICS, VALERIE SMITH, ROLAND EAGLIN, LINDA R. PAUL, CONSTANCE THORNTON, ALFRED SIRAGUSA, Anita Richards, Cherrie Stephens, Pilar Felix, ROBERT W. DUMOND, Pamela M. Harris, LLOYD A. PEDERSEN, Angelina Honra, SHARON L HAMMONDS, Grace I. Firisak, PATRICIA WILSON, BARBARA THOMPSON, RICHARD ALLBEE, ROXANY BUCKLESS, RICHARD L. LAYTON, Earl Stanley Waeltz, DR. WILLIAM YOUNG, MICHAEL MILLER, THERESA A. EVANS, DOLORES R. SEIBERT, KENNETH D. EGGERS, KATHERINE GAMBLE, CYNTHIA M. LANE, RANDALL L. LYNCH, HAROLD MCGINNIS, ELIZABETH FERRENTINO, Luther V. Pruitt, George Dillard, GEOFFREY W. FROST, Barbara E. Tabellion, AUDREY PUGH, RICHARD MORETTO, TALMADGE H. BRAXTON, JOHN K. DEGOLIER, DOROTHY HOLLEY, Lawrence Nelson, SARAH S. KOHLLMAN, Michael A. Arnold, CHARLES BETZLER, ZIZO CARABALLO, HAZEL VEST, SHELDON SMITH, ALLEN CERRITELLI, Peggie N. Kilpatrick, ALISA GRANT-CARTER, Khristopher Hawley, DEBORAH L. STROCK, EDMUND J. PRISBY, LINDA WINGARD, DOROTHY BROWN, SHIRLEE MCCULLOUGH, Raymond Triglia, CAROLYN JOHNSON, Beverly Renne, JAMES PETERS, BARBARA BARNWELL, Laticia Shimodor, DELORES A. DIGILIO, Thomas Adams, et al., SYNIA QUANTRICE LAURENCE, FLOYD E. STAI, Shane Sudduth, BARBARA SHULER, ASA HOLCOMB, PATRICK O'BRIEN, Roland Griffin, Jr., CLAUDE TAYLOR, MAVIS K. ARFMAN, Reabon Walker, JACK W. ELDERKIN, Charles McIntosh, FREDERICK L. PLETKA, ANGIERENE JACKSON, Byron Rubey, THOMAS KILGALLON, GARY ROBERTS, Judy Butts, Brenda Pierce, Melvin Willoughby, DOLLY SANDERS, ELLA SINGER, Steven Messer, NANCY L PHELPS, CHARLOTTE ANN SAWYER, EDMUND B. DWYER, Cheryl Green Jackson, June Wigglesworth, JERRY A. HARGIS, CHARLIE WILLIAMS, Reva Smith, Marvin Morgan, KATHLEEN ROE, JELLEST LEWIS, DONALD WIREMAN, ALAN DESPOSITO, VICKIE GARNHUM, Gilbert Vega, Robbie F. Betanzos, Ronald Jones, SARA JEANETTE BROOKS, SHARON R. BAILEY, JAMES B. KELLY, JR, Sharon Hawley, LYNNOEL FRANCISCO, ALMAJEAN SMITH, Randall Logsdon, Arthur Selig, SHIRLEY RODGERS, GWENDOLYN STATEN, LEWIS S. BOYCE, LINDA HARPER, jose zabala, TIMOTHY F. HOLLAND, HANS J. PFEIFFER, JOHN JOHNSON, JOHN GIARDINA and RONALD D. GOGLEY
Defendant: ANITA ROY
Consolidated Plaintiff: PAMELA L. BEAZLEY, THOMAS E. MAY, JAMES KILLIAM, CATHERINE PARSON, CLINTON D. RAMEY, FANNY ECKER, JOAN FREER, WAVERLY B. LEDBETTER, PATRICIA LITZAU, HOWARD L. PHILLIPS, JUDITH ANESGART, ANDREA MAZEN, NITZA AVILES, KATHLEEN W. REGISTER, KERRY L. PARKER, Alma J. Brown, HARRY M. STEWART, JAMES D. PEACE, BRIAN BELLAND, WARREN M. KELLOGG, THOMAS SLYE, JR., SUSAN LEDBETTER, BARBARA J. STEWART, MARIETTA S. RAMEY, GIOVANNA GHEGAN and RICK W. HASKETT
Case Number: 3:2013cv02418
Filed: February 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated, at the direction of chambers and with the approval of the MDL Panel. (dm )
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER that the Court recommends to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the litigation known as "In Re: Plavix Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Lability Litigation (No. II)," MDL No. 2418, be closed. The Clerk of the Court for the District of New Jersey shall transmit this Order to the Panel. Should the Panel accept this Court's recommendation, the Clerk of the Court for the District of New Jersey shall close MDL No. 13-2418. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/05/2019. (jem)
October 7, 2019 Filing 445 Transcript of STATUS CONFERENCE Proceedings held on 09/17/2019, before Judge FREDA L. WOLFSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber Vincent Russoniello (609-588-9516). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 10/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2020. (jmh)
September 17, 2019 Filing 444 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 9/17/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Vincent Russoniello.) (jmm, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER that a status conference for Plaintiffs Jeannette Irby, Willis Bryant, Jr. and Laura Rudman is set for 9/17/2019, at 10:00am; Plaintiffs Jeannette Irby and Laura Rudman are required to appear in person at the status conference; Plaintiff Willis Bryant, Jr. is required to appear at the status conference by video conference, or if video conference facilities are not available, by telephone; Plaintiffs Irby, Bryant, and Rudman shall be prepared to serve Defendants with the names of any experts Plaintiff has retained in the litigation, or explain to the Court steps taken to identify and retain expert witnesses; if any Plaintiff fails to appear at the status conference or otherwise comply with the requirements set forth in this Order, such Plaintiff's claims shall be subject to dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/12/2019. (jem)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER that Defendants' #435 Motion to Dismiss Complaints of Plaintiffs Listed in Attachment A with prejudice for Failure to Comply with Orders is granted. The Claims of Plaintiffs listed in Attachment A are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/2/2018. (mps)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER that Defendants' #439 Motion to Dismiss Complaints of Plaintiffs Listed in Attachment A with prejudice for Failure to Comply with Orders is granted. The Claims of Plaintiffs listed in Attachment A are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/2/2019. (mps)
September 6, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #440 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With Court Orders. Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 6, 2018 Filing 440 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With Court Orders by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Supplement)(FAUVRE, DAVID)
August 1, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #439 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With Court Orders. Motion set for 9/4/2018 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
July 31, 2018 Filing 439 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With Court Orders by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Supplement)(FAUVRE, DAVID)
July 19, 2018 Filing 438 Transcript of STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/27/2018, before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Court Reporter- Vincent Russoniello (609-588-9516). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 8/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2018. (kas, )
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss in the cases listed in this Order are granted. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/29/2018. (mps)
June 27, 2018 Filing 436 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 6/27/2018. Status letters due by 9/28/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder Vincent Russoniello.) (jmm, )
June 15, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #435 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With the Court Order. Motion set for 7/16/2018 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
June 14, 2018 Filing 435 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With the Court Order by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Supplement)(FAUVRE, DAVID)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER Dismissing Complaints of Plaintiffs listed in exhibit A with prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's Orders. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/8/2018. (km)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER Dismissing Complaints of Plaintiffs in 17-1057, 17-1058, 17-1431, 17-1426, 17-1430, and Michael Triplett only in 13-4516 with prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's Orders. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/5/2018. (mps)
May 29, 2018 Filing 432 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ANTHONY M. MAJAHAD (mps)
May 14, 2018 Filing 431 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Robert Noland. (mmh)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER that counsel for Defendants, Lead Plaintiffs' counsel and counsel for JKJ Partnership 2011 LLP, shall appear for an in-person status conference on 6/27/2018 at 10:30 AM. In the event that Civil Action No. 13-1166( Plaintiff Eugene Thomas), has not been dismissed, the law firm of H.L. Penick & Associates shall also appear at the in-person conference. Plaintiffs Laura Rudman and Michael Briggs, shall appear in person for the 6/27/2018 status conference. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to pro se Plaintiffs Laura Rudman and Michael Briggs. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/9/2018. (mps)
May 8, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone Conference held on 5/8/2018, ( In-Person Status Conference set for 6/27/2018 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jmm, )
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 429 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL without prejudice as to Civil Action 16-cv-8854. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/1/2018. (mps)
May 1, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #428 Stipulation filed by Lizette Radovic on 4/30/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. The Clerks office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing. PLEASE RESUBMIT USING the event Stipulation of Dismissal found under Other Filings, Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
April 30, 2018 Filing 428 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Voluntary by Stipulation by Gregg Mace, Jennifer Lee Mace. (RADOVIC, LIZETTE)
April 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #427 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/21/2018 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
April 27, 2018 Filing 427 MOTION to Dismiss by Gregg Mace, Jennifer Lee Mace. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(RADOVIC, LIZETTE)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiffs Elijha Williams and Mae Bell Williams in Civil Action 13-4518. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/24/2018. (mps)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiff Robert L McGriff in Civil Action 13-4518. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/24/2018. (mps)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiffs Billy R. Pollock and Dorinda J. Pollock in Civil Action 13-4519. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/24/2018. (mps)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiff Catherine E. Dunn in Civil Action 13-4519. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/24/2018. (mps)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiff JUDY BROWN in Civil Action 13-1388. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/24/2018. (mps)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiff DEROTHA LITTLE in Civil Action 13-1387. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/24/2018. (mps)
April 9, 2018 Filing 420 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. Amendment to #419 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With the Court's Orders . (FAUVRE, DAVID)
April 9, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #419 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With the Court's Orders. Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
April 9, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #419 Motion to Dismiss submitted by David Fauvre on 4/9/2018 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE SIGNATURE PAGE ONLY with a proper signature (s/ David Fauvre.) USING THE EVENT Amended Document (Not Motion/Complaint) found under Other Filings, Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
April 9, 2018 Filing 419 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With the Court's Orders by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Supplement)(FAUVRE, DAVID)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 418 STIPULATION AND ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Civil Case No. 17-1139 without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/4/2018. (mps)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER granting #415 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to LAURA WELCH RAY on behalf of JKJ Partnership 2011 LLP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/12/2018. (mps)
March 5, 2018 Filing 416 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney RALPH D. MCBRIDE; HEATH A. NOVOSAD; PHILLIP L. SAMPSON, JR; TONY L. VISAGE; CHRISTOPHER F. CUETO and BLAIR R. LOOCKE terminated. (CUETO, CHRISTOPHER)
February 16, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #415 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Laura W. Ray. Motion set for 3/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
February 16, 2018 Filing 415 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Laura W. Ray by JKJ PARTNERSHIP 2011 LLP. (RAY, LAURA)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 414 NOTICE and ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Civil Case No. 14-4982. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/14/2018. (km)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 413 STIPULATION AND ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Civil Case No. 13-1188 without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/14/2018. (mps)
February 13, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone/Status Conference held on 2/13/2018. Telephone Conference Call set for 5/8/2018 at 11:00. Status letter due one week prior. (jmm, )
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 412 STIPULATION AND ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Civil Case No. 16-3078 with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/13/2018. (mps)
February 13, 2018 Filing 411 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JOHN NICHOLAS (SNAPKA, KATHRYN)
January 25, 2018 Filing 410 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney GERALD CHARLES ROBINSON terminated. (ROBINSON, GERALD)
January 25, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #409 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Gerald Robinson on 1/24/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice (Other). As previously mentioned, PLEASE RESUBMIT USING the event NOTICE TO WITHDRAW FROM NEF AS TO CASE, found under Other Filings, Notices and when prompted, terminate counsel. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
January 24, 2018 Filing 409 NOTICE by JKJ PARTNERSHIP 2011 LLP of Withdrawal of Gerald C. Robinson as Counsel (ROBINSON, GERALD)
January 24, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #408 Notice to Withdraw as Counsel as to Gerald C. Robinson, Esq. filed by Michael Fitzgerald on 1/24/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice (Other). The Withdrawing Attorney must resubmit the document using the event Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case found under Other Filings, Notices and when prompted, terminate themselves as counsel. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
January 24, 2018 Filing 408 NOTICE by JKJ PARTNERSHIP 2011 LLP NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF GERALD C. ROBINSON AS COUNSEL FOR JKJ PARTNERSHIP 2011 LLP (FITZGERALD, MICHAEL)
January 24, 2018 Filing 407 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL D FITZGERALD on behalf of JKJ PARTNERSHIP 2011 LLP (FITZGERALD, MICHAEL)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER that the Court shall hold the next telephonic status conference at 2:00 PM Eastern time on 2/13/2018. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/22/2018. (mps)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 405 STIPULATION AND ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Civil Case No. 13-1187 with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/17/2018. (km)
January 8, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone/Status Conference set for 1/22/2018 11:30 AM before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE TIME CHANGE. (jmm, )
January 5, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone Conference held on 1/5/2018, ( Telephone/Status Conference set for 2/13/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jmm, )
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 404 NOTICE and ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Civil Case No. 15-852 with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/20/2017. (km)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 403 NOTICE and ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Civil Case No. 15-822 with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/20/2017. (km)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 NOTICE and ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Civil Case No. 15-812 with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/20/2017. (km)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 401 NOTICE and ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Civil Case No. 15-801 with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/20/2017. (km)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 400 NOTICE and ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Civil Case No. 15-793 with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/20/2017. (km)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 399 NOTICE AND ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing with prejudice as to Civil Action 15-cv-858, NANCY DIPERNA (15-858) terminated.. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/20/2017. (mps)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 398 NOTICE and ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Civil Case No. 15-783 with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/20/2017. (km)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 397 NOTICE AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL with prejudice as to Civil Action 15-cv-798, VICKI RAFEL (15-798) terminated.. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/20/2017. (mps)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER that the Plaintiff PHYLLIS JACKSON (Individually, and as ADMINISTRATOR on behalf of the estate of JUANITA JACKSON, deceased) Voluntarily Dismisses the Civil Complaint 15-902 with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/15/2017. (km)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER that the Plaintiffs ANITA M. COLEMAN and ULYSEE COLEMAN, JR. Voluntarily Dismisses the Civil Complaint 14-7342 against Defendants. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/15/2017. (km)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER that the Plaintiffs CECELIA A. TROTTER and DONALD R. TROTTER Voluntarily Dismisses Civil Complaint 14-7342 against Defendants with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/15/2017. (km)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER that the Plaintiff BYRON RUBEY Voluntarily Dismisses Civil Complaint 14-5410 against Defendants with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/15/2017. (km)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER that the Plaintiffs Albert Bugal and Shirley M. Bugal Voluntarily Dismiss the Civil Complaint 13-4521 against Defendants with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/15/2017. (km)
December 13, 2017 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone/Status Conference held on 12/13/2017. Telephone /Status Conference call set for 1/22/2018 @ 10:30 A.M. (jmm, )
November 28, 2017 Filing 391 Transcript of MOTIONS held on 11/15/2017, before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Court Reporter - Vincent Russoniello (609-588-9516). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 12/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2018. (kas)
November 28, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #387 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice for Failure to Comply with the Court's Orders entered September 19, 2017. Motion set for 1/2/2018 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 27, 2017 Filing 387 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice for Failure to Comply with the Court's Orders entered September 19, 2017 by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 27, 2017 Filing 386 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #334 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #333 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #332 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(FAUVRE, DAVID)
November 22, 2017 Filing 385 Letter from Anand Agneshwar re #384 Letter. (FAUVRE, DAVID)
November 17, 2017 Filing 384 Letter from Shayna E. Sacks, Liaison Counsel re #357 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,. (SACKS, SHAYNA)
November 15, 2017 Filing 383 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2017 re #343 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Randall Tackett filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC., DECISION RESERVED #342 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Lemuel Moye filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC., DECISION RESERVED #344 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC., DECISION RESERVED ( Telephone Conference Call set for 12/13/2017 11:00 AM before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (Court Reporter/Recorder Vincent Russoniello.) (jmm, )
November 9, 2017 Filing 382 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney re #343 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Randall Tackett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I (Corrected))(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting #334 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiffs Charles F. Novitski and Marilyn E. Novitski. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/7/2017. (mps)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting #333 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiffs Anthony M. Majahad and Dorry Majahad.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/7/2017. (mps)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER granting #332 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiff Alfred R. Harrison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/7/2017. (mps)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in Civil Case No. 15-1077 as to Plaintiff ANITA ROY. Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that she intends to proceed pro Se. Civil Case No. 15-7526 is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of her intentions regarding representation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/7/2017. (mmh)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER granting 80 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in Civil Case 13-4519 as to Plaintiffs Beverly Burton and Michael Burton. Plaintiffs are required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that they intend to proceed pro se. Civil Case No. 13-4519 is stayed until after Plaintiffs have notified the Court of their intentions regarding representation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/7/2017. (mps)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in Civil Case No. 15-1077 as to Plaintiff MARYJOE GRIFFIN. Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that she intends to proceed pro Se. Civil Case No. 15-1077 is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of her intentions regarding representation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/7/2017. (mps)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Substitute Party in Civil Action No. 14-634. Tyrone M. Simpson, as Administrator of the Estate of Mark Simpson, is substituted as Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/7/2017. (mmh)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER granting #331 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Christopher J. Derosa. Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that he intends to proceed pro se. Civil Case No. 14-7342 is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of his intentions regarding representation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/6/2017. (km)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting #330 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Thelma Rogers. Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that she intends to proceed pro se. Civil Case No. 14-7342 is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of her intentions regarding representation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/6/2017. (km)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER granting #321 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Peggy Jacobs. Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that she intends to proceed pro Se. Civil Case No. 13-4521 is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of her intentions regarding representation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/6/2017. (km)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting #318 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Mary Loveday. Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that she intends to proceed pro Se. Civil Case No. 13-4521 is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of her intentions regarding representation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/6/2017. (km)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting #319 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Lucy Randolph. Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that she intends to proceed pro Se. Civil Case No. 13-4516 is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of her intentions regarding representation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/6/2017. (km)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting #320 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Frank D. Williams. Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that he intends to proceed pro Se. Civil Case No. 13-4516 is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of his intentions regardingrepresentation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/6/2017. (km)
November 6, 2017 Filing 371 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #344 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jocelyn A. Wiesner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 6, 2017 Filing 370 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #343 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Randall Tackett (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 6, 2017 Filing 369 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #342 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Lemuel Moye (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jocelyn A. Wiesner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER granting #317 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiff Nancy Renshaw. Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that she intends to proceed pro Se. Civil Case No. 13-4521 is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of her intentions regardingrepresentation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/6/2017. (km)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting #315 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiff Gracie Seats. Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that she intends to proceed Pro Se. Civil Case No. 17-7342 is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of her intentions regarding representation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/6/2017. (km)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting #316 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Jeri Klein. Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that she intends to proceed pro se. Civil Case No. 13-4521 is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of her intentions regarding representation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/6/2017. (km)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER regarding the re-filing agreement for California non-residents. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/6/2017. (mps)
November 2, 2017 Filing 363 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #359 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion, ERRATA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 2, 2017 Filing 362 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #358 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion, ERRATA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 1, 2017 Filing 364 Transcript of STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/17/2017, before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Court Reporter-Vincent Russoniello (609-588-9516). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 11/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2018. (kas, )
November 1, 2017 Filing 361 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #357 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion, ERRATA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(SACKS, SHAYNA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 31, 2017 Filing 360 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #357 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion, ERRATA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
October 31, 2017 Filing 359 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #342 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Lemuel Moye (Attachments: #1 Certification of Shayna E. Sacks, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
October 31, 2017 Filing 358 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #343 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Randall Tackett (Attachments: #1 Certification Shayna E. Sacks, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
October 30, 2017 Filing 357 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #344 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Certification of Shayna E. Sacks, #2 Statement IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS NOT IN DISPUTE, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting #314 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiff SARAH R. THOMAS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/24/2017. (mps)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting #291 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiffs ROY A. WARREN and BARBARA WARREN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/24/2017. (mps)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER granting #290 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiffs CHARLENE SMITH and HERMAN D. SMITH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/24/2017. (mps)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting #289 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiffs JACK W. ELDERKIN and CATHERINE ELDERKIN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/24/2017. (mps)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting #288 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiffs LEON R. DORSEY and SHIRLEY DORSEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/24/2017. (mps)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER granting #287 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiff Lavelle Billip. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/24/2017. (mps)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting #305 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/24/2017. (km)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting #304 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/24/2017. (km)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting #286 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Counsel shall mail Plaintiff Ruby Smith a complete and accurate copy of her entire file within 14 days of this Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/24/2017. (mps)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #294 Motion For An Order Sustaining Defendants' Objections to Special Master's Order. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/18/2017. (mps)
October 17, 2017 Filing 346 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson & Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Motion Hearing held on 10/17/2017 re #294 MOTION For An Order Sustaining Defendants' Objections to Special Master's Order filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.: Court Ordered Motion is granted in part and denied in part; Order to be filed., Status Conference held on 10/17/2017. (Court Reporter/Recorder Vincent Russoniello.) (jmm, )
October 17, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #345 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Moshe Rubin, #344 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #342 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Lemuel Moye, #343 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Randall Tackett. Motions set for 11/20/2017 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
October 16, 2017 Filing 345 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Moshe Rubin by BARBARA M THORPE. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Shayna E. Sacks, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
October 16, 2017 Filing 344 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute, #3 Certification of Jocelyn A. Wiesner, Esq., #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Text of Proposed Order, #17 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
October 16, 2017 Filing 343 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Randall Tackett by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Jocelyn A. Wiesner, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H (Part I), #11 Exhibit H (Part II), #12 Exhibit H (Part III), #13 Exhibit H (Part IV), #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Text of Proposed Order, #17 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
October 16, 2017 Filing 342 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Lemuel Moye by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Jocelyn A. Wiesner, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Text of Proposed Order, #16 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 341 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #294 MOTION For An Order Sustaining Defendants' Objections to Special Master's Order (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Stipulation and ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Civil Case 17-1930 with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/10/2017. (km)
October 6, 2017 Filing 339 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
October 2, 2017 Filing 338 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #330 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for THELMA ROGERS (FAUVRE, DAVID)
October 2, 2017 Filing 337 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #334 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for CHARLES F. NOVITSKI and MARILYN E. NOVITSKI (FAUVRE, DAVID)
October 2, 2017 Filing 336 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #333 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for ANTHONY M. MAJAHAD AND DORRY MAJAHAD (FAUVRE, DAVID)
October 2, 2017 Filing 335 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #332 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Alfred R. Harrison (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 28, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #333 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #334 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #331 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , and #332 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motions set for 11/6/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
September 28, 2017 Filing 334 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CHARLES F. NOVITSKI, MARILYN E. NOVITSKI. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 28, 2017 Filing 333 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ANTHONY M. MAJAHAD, DORRY MAJAHAD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 28, 2017 Filing 332 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ALFRED R. HARRISON. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 28, 2017 Filing 331 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CHRISTOPHER J. DEROSA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 27, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #330 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 11/6/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 27, 2017 Filing 330 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by THELMA ROGERS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 27, 2017 Filing 329 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #314 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Sarah Thomas (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 27, 2017 Filing 328 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #315 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for GRACIE SEATS (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 27, 2017 Filing 327 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #316 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for JERI KLEIN (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 27, 2017 Filing 326 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #317 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for NANCY RENSHAW (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 27, 2017 Filing 325 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #318 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for MARY LOVEDAY (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 27, 2017 Filing 324 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #319 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for LUCY RANDOLPH (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 27, 2017 Filing 323 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #320 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for FRANK WILLIAMS (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 27, 2017 Filing 322 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #321 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for PEGGY JACOBS (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 26, 2017 Reset Deadlines as to #319 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #320 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #321 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion reset for 11/6/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 26, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #319 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #320 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #321 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 11/6/2017 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 25, 2017 Filing 321 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PEGGY JACOBS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 25, 2017 Filing 320 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by FRANK D. WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 25, 2017 Filing 319 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by LUCY A. RANDOLPH. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 25, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #314 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #315 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #318 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #316 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #317 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 11/6/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 25, 2017 Filing 318 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MARY LOVEDAY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Notice of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 25, 2017 Filing 317 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by NANCY RENSHAW. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Notice of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 25, 2017 Filing 316 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JERI KLEIN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Notice of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 25, 2017 Filing 315 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GRACIE M. SEATS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Notice of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 25, 2017 Filing 314 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SARAH R. THOMAS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Notice of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 20, 2017 Filing 313 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #291 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for ROY A. WARREN and BARBARA WARREN (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 20, 2017 Filing 312 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #286 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for RUBY SMITH (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 20, 2017 Filing 311 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #290 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for CHARLENE SMITH and HERMAN SMITH (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 20, 2017 Filing 310 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #304 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for RONALD MYERS and CATHERINE MYERS (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 20, 2017 Filing 309 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #305 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for CHARLES HENDERSON and DEBRA HENDERSON (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 20, 2017 Filing 308 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #289 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for JACK ELDERKIN and CATHERINE ELDERKIN (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 20, 2017 Filing 307 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #288 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for LEON R. DORSEY and SHIRLEY DORSEY (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 20, 2017 Filing 306 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #287 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for LAVELLE BILLIP (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 20, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #304 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #305 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 10/16/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 19, 2017 Filing 305 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CHARLES HENDERSON, DEBRA HENDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 19, 2017 Filing 304 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by KATHRYN MYERS, RONALD P MYERS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting #273 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys DIANE MARIE COFFEY, HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK, RICK BARRECA, SHAYNA E. SACKS, and Steven M. Aroesty terminated as to Plaintiff Michael Triplett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/19/2017. (mps)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER granting #272 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney DIANE MARIE COFFEY, HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK, RICK BARRECA, SHAYNA E. SACKS, and Steven M. Aroesty terminated as to Plaintiff Ella Cox. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/19/2017. (mps)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER granting #260 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney MATTHEW B. MORELAND terminated as to Plaintiff Annie Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/19/2017. (mps)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting #259 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney MATTHEW B. MORELAND terminated as to Plaintiff Anna Folkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/19/2017. (mps)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting #258 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney MATTHEW B. MORELAND terminated as to Plaintiff Linda Pettenridge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/19/2017. (mps)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting #257 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney MATTHEW B. MORELAND terminated as to Plaintiff Joseph Spengler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/19/2017. (mps)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting #256 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney MATTHEW B. MORELAND terminated as to Plaintiff Susan Burns. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/19/2017. (mps)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 5: Common Benefit, Time and Expense Rules, Holdback, Assessments and Related Issues. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/18/2017. (mps)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER approving The Miller Firm Agreement. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/18/2017. (mps)
September 18, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #294 MOTION For An Order Sustaining Defendants' Objections to Special Master's Order . Motion set for 10/16/2017 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 15, 2017 Filing 294 MOTION For An Order Sustaining Defendants' Objections to Special Master's Order by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Gavin J. Rooney, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Text of Proposed Order, #21 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
September 15, 2017 Filing 293 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #254 MOTION for Hearing on proposed common benefit order (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
September 15, 2017 Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE MARIE COFFEY on behalf of DOROTHY C. ANDREWS, BRIAN BELLAND, NANCY BLAINE, Wretha Bowles, JESSE COOK, WALTRIEL S. CRUM, CHARLES W. DENMEAD, ROBIN DENMEAD, CHRISTOPHER J. DEROSA, LANA L. DINAN, MICHAEL E. DINAN, JAMES R. EKSTROM, JOYCE EKSTROM, RICHARD EVANS, VERA M. EVANS, TYRONE FURMAN, DONNA FUTRELL, GASTON L. GHEGAN, GIOVANNA GHEGAN, DONALD M. HAMILTON(3:14-cv-07342), NORMA J. HAMILTON(3:14-cv-07342), JERRY A. HARGIS, ALFRED R. HARRISON, RONALD J. HART, CHRISTINE M. HASKETT, RICK W. HASKETT, GEOFFREY T. HILDRETH, DENNIS HOWELL, PAULINE HOWELL, DAVID R. HOWTON, LINDA F. HOWTON, LORRI HUSKEY, RUSSELL R. HUSKEY, DOROTHY JOHNSON, LARRY N. JOHNSON, TOM C. JOHNSTON, DEBBIE JORDAN, JIMMY E. JORDAN, JOSEPH F. KANE, WENDY KANE, WARREN M. KELLOGG, ERNEST W. KITCHEN, THERESA KITCHEN, KENNETH D. KOVACH, SHIRLEY J. KOVACH, KATHY LAROCCO, MICHAEL J. LAROCCO, DOREEN A. LICAYAN, MINNIE LILLEY, KARL A. LITZAU, PATRICIA LITZAU, ANTHONY M. MAJAHAD, DORRY MAJAHAD, JUDY M. MARTIN, GLENNA U. MARTINEZ, JUAN G. MARTINEZ, BERNICE MAYEUX, CLARENCE MAYEUX, JEFFRY J. MENGEL, RONALD MILLER(3:14-cv-07342), TAMMIE O. MILLER(3:14-cv-07342), CHARLES F. NOVITSKI, MARILYN E. NOVITSKI, GREGORY S. PARKER, KERRY L. PARKER, BRENDA PEACE, JAMES D. PEACE, DARRELL G. PHILLIPS, LINDA F. PHILLIPS, JUDY C. PIERCE, ANGELA PISANO, LOUIS PISANO, RODNEY D. QUALLS, CATHEY M. ROBINSON, JOSEPH S. ROBINSON, DEBORAH L. ROGERS, THERESA RYAN, GEORGE SHURRUSH, LEETA L. SLAUGHTER, MONTIE G. SLAUGHTER, TIMOTHY SPRINGS, HAROLD L. STOCKSTILL, SACHIKO STOCKSTILL, GENE E. TAYLOR, KRYSTAL M. TAYLOR, MARVIN L. TODD, MARY TODD, JERRY O. TUCKER, WANDA W. VENTRES, OMA L. WADDELL, WILLIAM WAIBEL, STEPHEN L. WARGO, CAROLYN M. WILEY, LARRY D. WILEY, BRENDA L. WOOLLS, BERNADETTE A. YARNELL(3:14-cv-07342 individually and as the proposed administrator of ELOISE B. WIGAL, deceased), MARILYN J. YEAGER-SEWELL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Schedule of Actions)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 15, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #291 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #290 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #287 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #288 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #286 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #289 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motions set for 10/16/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 14, 2017 Filing 291 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BARBARA WARREN, ROY A. WARREN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 14, 2017 Filing 290 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CHARLENE SMITH, HERMAN D. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 14, 2017 Filing 289 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CATHERINE ELDERKIN, JACK W. ELDERKIN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 14, 2017 Filing 288 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by LEON R. DORSEY, SHIRLEY DORSEY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 14, 2017 Filing 287 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lavelle Billip. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 14, 2017 Filing 286 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by RUBY SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-41)transferring certain action to this court. (eh, )
September 12, 2017 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson & Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J.: Status Conference held on 9/12/2017. Status Conference set for 10/17/2017 @ 2:00 P.M. Courtroom 5E.(mm)
September 12, 2017 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson & Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J.: Status Conference held on 9/12/2017. Status Conference set for 10/17/2017 @ 2:00 P.M. Courtroom 5E. (jmm, )
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 STIPULATION and ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing claims brought by Plaintiff Dennis Ekstedt in civil case no. 3:14-cv-06873. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/12/2017. (km)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 STIPULATION AND ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Claims brought by Plaintiff Kenneth Petit in Civil Case No. 3:13-cv-00991. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/12/2017. (km)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 STIPULATION and ORDER Reopening Civil Case No. 3:13-cv-00991; Vacating the conditional dismissals and reinstating Plaintiff Kenneth Petit and Herbert Santana. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/11/2017. (km)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 STIPULATION and ORDER Reopening Case; Vacating the conditional dismissals and reinstating Plaintiff Connie Good to Civil Case No. 3:14-cv-01262 and Dennis Ekstedt to Civil Case No. 3:14-cv-06873. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/11/2017. (km)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 280 LETTER ORDER substituting representative Plaintiff Elizabeth Porterfield for Roechelle Breeding to read: ROECHELLE BREEDING, on behalf of the Estate of Elizabeth Porterfield in Civil Action 17-cv-1424. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/7/2017. (mps)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Caption of Civil Case No. 3:15-cv-07526 to Substitute Representative for Deceased Plaintiff Maurice Roy. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/8/2017. (km)
September 7, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The RESPONSE in Docket Entries #276 and #278 submitted by David Fauvre on 9/6/2017 appear to be duplicates. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (km)
September 7, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The RESPONSE in Docket Entries #275 and #277 submitted by David Fauvre on 9/6/2017 appear to be duplicates. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (km)
September 6, 2017 Filing 278 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #273 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Michael Triplett (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 6, 2017 Filing 277 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #272 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Ella Cox (FAUVRE, DAVID)
September 6, 2017 Filing 276 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #273 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Michael Triplett (FAUVRE, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 6, 2017 Filing 275 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #272 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Ella Cox (FAUVRE, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 6, 2017 Filing 274 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE MARIE COFFEY on behalf of STEPHANIE L. SOUTH (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 5, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #273 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #272 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 10/2/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
September 1, 2017 Filing 273 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MICHAEL TRIPLETT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
September 1, 2017 Filing 272 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ELLA J. COX. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COFFEY, DIANE)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal as to Civil Action 17-cv-1059 with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/28/2017. (mps)
August 24, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note: Text minute entered on 8/23/2017 was made in ERROR. Telephone conference call was held in Civil 11-6476(FLW) ONLY. (jmm, )
August 23, 2017 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone Conference held on 8/23/2017. (jmm, )
August 22, 2017 Filing 269 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #254 MOTION for Hearing (FAUVRE, DAVID)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER that Plaintiffs motion for extension of time to complete discovery is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Complaint Civil Case No. 13-4521 is Dismissed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/17/2017. (km)
August 17, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #257 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #256 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #258 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #259 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #260 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motions set for 9/18/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
August 16, 2017 Filing 267 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #260 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (FAUVRE, DAVID)
August 16, 2017 Filing 266 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #257 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (FAUVRE, DAVID)
August 16, 2017 Filing 265 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #258 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (FAUVRE, DAVID)
August 16, 2017 Filing 264 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #259 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (FAUVRE, DAVID)
August 16, 2017 Filing 263 RESPONSE to Motion filed by SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #256 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (FAUVRE, DAVID)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 262 STIPULATION AND ORDER that all claims brought by ROBERT J PATT, SR. (13-4518) are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/16/2017. (mps)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 STIPULATION AND ORDER that all claims brought by JACKIE GEDEON (13-4518) are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/16/2017. (mps)
August 16, 2017 Filing 260 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ANNIE JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MORELAND, MATTHEW)
August 16, 2017 Filing 259 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anna Folkerson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MORELAND, MATTHEW)
August 16, 2017 Filing 258 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by LINDA PETTENRIDGE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MORELAND, MATTHEW)
August 16, 2017 Filing 257 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Joseph Spengler. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MORELAND, MATTHEW)
August 16, 2017 Filing 256 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SUSAN BURNS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MORELAND, MATTHEW)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-40) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
August 9, 2017 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 8/9/2017. (jmm, )
August 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: In Person Status Conference held on 8/9/2017. (mm)
August 8, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #254 MOTION for Hearing . Motion set for 9/5/2017 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
August 8, 2017 Filing 254 MOTION for Hearing by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING COMMON BENEFIT, TIME AND EXPENSE RULES, HOLDBACK, ASSESSMENTS AND RELATED ISSUES, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 LETTER ORDER substituting Nancy Bedford for Plaintiff Barry Bedford in case 17-cv-1054 and Patricia Casale for Plaintiff Deana Altobello in case 17-cv-1139. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/28/2017. (mmh)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 THIRD AMENDED MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/18/2017. (mps)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting William Hiltner Counsel's #238 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; Counsel shall mail Plaintiff a complete and accurate copy of his entire file within fourteen (14) days of this Order; Counsel is relieved of any further responsibility in this case with regard to representation of Plaintiff William Hiltner; Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that he intends to proceed pro Se; this case is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of his intentions regarding representation and the parties have conferred with the Court regarding new discovery deadlines, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/5/2017. (seb)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #241 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Counsel shall mail Plaintiff a complete and accurate copy of their entire file within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Counsel is relieved of any further responsibility in this case with regard to representation of Plaintiff James Montgomery. Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that he intends to proceed pro se. This case is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of their intentions regarding representation and the parties have conferred with the Court regarding new discovery deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/5/2017. (mps)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting #240 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Counsel shall mail Plaintiffs a complete and accurate copy of their entire file within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Counsel is relieved of any further responsibility in this case with regard to representation of Plaintiffs Allan Stephenson and Anna Stephenson. Plaintiffs are required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that they intend to proceed pro se. This case is stayed until after Plaintiffs have notified the Court of their intentions regarding representation and the parties have conferred with the Court regarding new discovery deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/5/2017. (mps)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting #239 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Counsel shall mail Plaintiff a complete and accurate copy of her entire file within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Counsel is relieved of any further responsibility in this case with regard to representation of Plaintiff Suzanne Wilson. Plaintiff is required to either retain new counsel or inform the Court that she intends to proceed pro se. This case is stayed until after Plaintiff has notified the Court of her intentions regarding representation and the parties have conferred with the Court regarding new discovery deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/5/2017. (mps)
June 27, 2017 Filing 270 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 6/27/2017. Status Conference set for 8/9/2017 at 10:30 A.M. Courtroom 5E. (Court Reporter/Recorder Vincent Russoniello.) (mmh)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER that the Supplemental Plaintiff Profile Form Questions shall be completed by 9/1/2017 for each case not dismissed pursuant to the #235 Corrected Order Governing Supplemental Case Review. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/20/2017. (mps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2017: #1 Ex A) (jmm).
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 246 STIPULATION and ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing Case with Prejudice as to Civil Case No. 3:13-cv-00991. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/12/2017. (km)
June 7, 2017 Filing 245 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #238 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (FAUVRE, DAVID)
June 7, 2017 Filing 244 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #241 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (FAUVRE, DAVID)
June 7, 2017 Filing 243 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #240 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (FAUVRE, DAVID)
June 7, 2017 Filing 242 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #239 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (FAUVRE, DAVID)
June 6, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #240 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #241 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #239 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , and #238 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 7/3/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
June 5, 2017 Filing 241 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JAMES MONTGOMERY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
June 5, 2017 Filing 240 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ALLAN L. STEPHENSON, ANNA STEPHENSON. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
June 5, 2017 Filing 239 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SUZANNE WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
June 5, 2017 Filing 238 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by WILLIAM F. HILTNER. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
June 2, 2017 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by SHAYNA E. SACKS on behalf of SUZANNE WILSON (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing with prejudice Sharon Hawley, Kimberly Atkins, Hershel Hawley, Eldon Hawley, and Kristopher Hawley.(13-2083). Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/2/2017. (seb)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 CORRECTED ORDER GOVERNING SUPPLEMENTAL CASE REVEIW PROCESS. This Order replaces the #234 Order governing supplemental case review process entered on 5/2/2017. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/1/2017. (mps)
May 2, 2017 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Status Conference held on 5/2/2017, (Status Conference/Motion to Dismiss set for 6/27/2017 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.) (mm)
May 2, 2017 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 5/2/2017, ( Status Conference/Motion to Dismiss set for 6/27/2017 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jg, )
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER Governing Supplemental Case Review Process. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/2/2017. (km)
March 21, 2017 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson & Judge Bongiovanni: Status Conference held on 3/21/2017, ( Status Conference set for 5/2/2017 02:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jg, )
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting #232 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Theodore H. Chase terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/17/2017. (mps)
March 17, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #232 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Theodore H. Chase. Motion set for 4/17/2017 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
March 16, 2017 Filing 232 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Theodore H. Chase by JANICE AGAN, ALFONSO AGUILAR, STEVEN BALTADONIS, PATRICIA BUCK, Jennie Caddell, Anthony Ciarfello, ALAN DESPOSITO, RAY FOSTER, Pilar Felix, ALISA GRANT-CARTER, CYNTHIA HAMILTON, DOMINICK IMBIMBO, MATTIE JOHNSON, MARY MCGAHEE, DONALD NELSON, DONNA PLUMMER, ROBERT PLUMMER, JAROLD REGIER, MARY REGIER, ANIBAL SANTOS, ROBERT STAHNTEN, HAROLD SURRATT, JOHNNY SWINFORD, KATHRYNE SWINFORD, BARBARA THOMPSON, CARSON WHITE, JOHN YACKEY, jose zabala. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(AUDET, WILLIAM)
March 9, 2017 Filing 231 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew M. Miller to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ROBINSON, GERALD)
March 9, 2017 Filing 230 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice W. Scott Simmer to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ROBINSON, GERALD)
January 25, 2017 Filing 229 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney NICHOLAS C. HARBIST terminated. (HARBIST, NICHOLAS)
January 25, 2017 Filing 228 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY terminated. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
January 24, 2017 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: In Person- Status Conference held on 1/24/2017, ( In Person - Status Conference set for 3/14/2017 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jg, )
January 18, 2017 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN FINCH on behalf of JKJ PARTNERSHIP 2011 LLP (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(FINCH, NATHAN)
January 11, 2017 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA WELCH RAY on behalf of JKJ PARTNERSHIP 2011 LLP (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(RAY, LAURA)
January 11, 2017 Filing 225 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H NARWOLD on behalf of JKJ PARTNERSHIP 2011 LLP (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(NARWOLD, WILLIAM)
January 11, 2017 Filing 224 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PENDELL on behalf of JKJ PARTNERSHIP 2011 LLP (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(PENDELL, MICHAEL)
January 10, 2017 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE MARIE COFFEY on behalf of THELMA ROGERS (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(COFFEY, DIANE)
December 12, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Status Conference held on 12/12/2016. In Person Status Conference scheduled for 1/24/2017 @ 2:00 P.M. Courtroom 5E. (mm)
December 12, 2016 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 12/12/2016. In Person Status Conference scheduled for 1/24/2017 @ 2:00 P.M. Courtroom 5E. (jg, )
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting #206 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice for Failure to Provide Proof of Representative Status and all claims listed in Plaintiff's exhibit A are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/28/2016. (km)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-39) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
November 17, 2016 Filing 220 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 9, 2016 Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE MARIE COFFEY on behalf of Beverly Arcement, Gerald J. Arcement(14-7342), DONALD W. BEENE, ELLEN C. BEENE, PATRICIA BRENDLEN, DARRIA BROWN, DARRIA BROWN, Mary R. Bozarth(14-7342), ELIZABETH M. DAVIDSON(14-7342), JIMMY R. DEARMON(3:14-cv-07342), FANNY ECKER, JOHN ECKER, CRAIG FASLER, KATHY FASLER, DEIDRA GARRETT, DEIDRA GARRETT, BILL GILLIAM, BILL GILLIAM, CHARLOTTE H. GRANT, GWENDOLYN D. JACKSON, RONALD JACKSON, RONALD JACKSON, THOMAS J. MILLER, THOMAS J. MILLER(3:14-cv-07342, individually and as the proposed administrator of ALEXIS M. MILLER, deceased), JEREMY C. ROBINSON, JEREMY C. ROBINSON, ROBERTA ROSEN(3:14-cv-07342, individually and as the proposed administratrix of JOEL B. ROSEN, deceased), ROBERTA ROSEN, LESA SCIONEAUX, LESA SCIONEAUX, ANNETTE SEARGEANT, ANNETTE SEARGEANT, GRACIE M. SEATS, TERRY A. SHELTON, TERRY A. SHELTON, RUBY SMITH, BARBARA J. STEWART(3:14-cv-7342), HARRY M. STEWART, CHARLOTTE WALLER, ELLIOT WALLS (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(COFFEY, DIANE)
November 9, 2016 Filing 218 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE MARIE COFFEY on behalf of HARLAN F. ADDINGTON, GRANT L BENNETT, MILTON R BRADSHAW, RUBY M BURT, CAROL CHAIKEN, IRWIN CHAIKEN, DIANE L COLVIN, BARBARA CRISWELL, MATTIE L DAVIS, ANN M DREW, CLARENCE DREW, ELIZABETH FERRENTINO, ROBERT FERRENTINO, JACKIE GEDEON, CHARLES E GILL, DELORES M GILL, GLORIA HORTON, RANDALL E HORTON, GLORETTA V MAGEE, RICHARD P MASON, BRENDA MASTERS, CHARLES R MASTERS, ROBERT L MCGRIFF, KATHRYN MYERS, RONALD P MYERS, ROBERT L NOLAND, VIRGINIA L NOLAND, MAUREEN J PATT, ROBERT J PATT, JOHN T PETROVICH, PATRICIA PETROVICH, GARY PHELPS, NANCY L PHELPS, BRIAN R REDMOND, SUSAN G REDMOND, LINDA D REHMERT, PAUL E REHMERT, DOROTHY E WHITE, ELIJHA WILLIAMS, MAE BELL WILLIAMS, ELIZABETH A WORRELL, WILLIAM H WORRELL (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(COFFEY, DIANE)
November 8, 2016 Filing 217 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE MARIE COFFEY on behalf of GARY ARMANTROUT, NANCY K. ARMANTROUT, BRENDA A. ARRINGTON, SERAPHENE BARASH, ICEL M. BARTLEY, MAX L. BARTLEY, JERRY J. BASS, CHESTER L. BIRT, VIRGINIA M. BIRT, ROY D. BLAND, SUSAN L. BLAND, CLARENCE A. BLEVINS, HOLLY BLEVINS, CLAUDE A. BUGBEE, ELIZABETH BURKETT, WILLIAM J. BURKETT, BEVERLY BURTON, MICHAEL BURTON, ERIC COHEN, PATRICIA COHEN, JOSEPH P. CONNORS, ELLA J. COX, DELORES A. DIGILIO, JOSEPH B. DIGILIO, LEON R. DORSEY, SHIRLEY DORSEY, CATHERINE E. DUNN, NERLANDE ETIENNE, JAMES D. FALLON, VICKIE FALLON, LORETT FENT, ROBERT J. FENT, MARIA M. GARCIA, RICKY D. GARRISON, JOYCE A. GOGLEY, RONALD D. GOGLEY, RAIFORD L. GRIGSBY, BARBARA GRINKOVICH, JOE L. HAILE, CHARLES HENDERSON, DEBRA HENDERSON, DONNA J. HOPKINS, ROGER D. HOPKINS, JEANNETTE IRBY, DEBRA IZZO, RALPH IZZO, PEGGY JACOBS, THEODORE R. JORDAN, WANDA JORDAN, JERI KLEIN, BARBARA A. KRAKLIO, WALLACE R. KRAKLIO, JUANITA LANDRUM, BILLY V. LEWIS, JOY A. LONG, MARY LOVEDAY, DONALD R. MABES, REBECCA J. MABES, GEORGE MAVRONIS, CONNIE MCMULLEN, RONALD R. MCMULLEN, ANDREA S. MICHAUD, HENRY R. MICHAUD, BERNARD E. MILOWITZ, BRADLEY MORTICHESKY, JACKIE MORTICHESKY, ELIZABETH L. MOSLEY, GLORIA A. MUMM, PATRICIA L. PAIRAN, MARIE M. PERRIN, RONALD PIOTEREK, DORINDA J. POLLOCK, NANCY RENSHAW, THOMAS B. SQUIRES, SANGEETHA SRINIVASAN, BERNICE M. STANLEY, WILLIAM J. STANLEY, BARRY STICKER, ROBERT L. TAYLOR, ROZANNE TAYLOR, KATHERINE TOSCANO, NICOLAS TOSCANO, DEBORAH A. VALERI, IRENE S. VILLEGAS, PATRICIA M. WATKINS, MARY YARBER, NOBLE YEOMAN, CHARLES YOUNG, CLAUDETTE YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(COFFEY, DIANE)
November 8, 2016 Filing 216 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE MARIE COFFEY on behalf of ALICE AARON, PHILLIP D. AARON, DARNELLA ABRAMS, BOBBY AGEE, JUDY BROWN, Lavelle Billip, Mary Jo Bolton, Ralph E. Bolton, CATHERINE ELDERKIN, JACK W. ELDERKIN, ROBERT M. GIBBS, TAMMY M. GUTTERIDGE, JEFFREY D. HALE, LILLIE HALE, RALPH T. HARDEN, ALLAN D. JARED, MARIAN A. JARED, MARIE E. JIMENEZ, THEODORE R. JIMENEZ, BETTY SUE LEE, LOUIS LEE, LINDA C. LEWIS, KAREN L. LIPSKY, MARK A. LIPSKY, DEROTHA LITTLE, YOLANDA LOPEZ, JAMES E. LYTLE, JOY D. LYTLE, GLORIA J. MCCOIN, ROENA C. PATTERSON, LUCY A. RANDOLPH, DANIEL RIEDLE, WINIFRED W. RIEDLE, MARY E. ROSS, LANNY S. SHANE, RONIT SHANE, SARAH R. THOMAS, ANN TINGLER, SAMUEL L. TINGLER, MICHAEL TRIPLETT, BARBARA WARREN, ROY A. WARREN, LINDA G. WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(COFFEY, DIANE)
October 24, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Status Conference held on 10/24/2016. Status Conference set for 12/12/2016 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. (mm)
October 24, 2016 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 10/24/2016, ( Status Conference set for 12/12/2016 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jg, )
October 11, 2016 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone Conference held on 10/11/2016. (jg, )
September 12, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Status Conference held on 9/9/2016. Status Conference set for 10/24/2016 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. (mm)
September 9, 2016 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 9/9/2016, ( Status Conference set for 10/24/2016 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jg, )
August 16, 2016 Filing 215 Transcript of MOTION held on 6/27/2016, before Judge FREDA L. WOLFSON. Court Reporter Vincent Russoniello (609-588-9516). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016. (km)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-38) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
August 8, 2016 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by RICK BARRECA on behalf of BRENDA A. ARRINGTON (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(BARRECA, RICK)
August 4, 2016 Filing 212 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #206 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Provide Proof of Representative Status (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CLINE, KEVIN)
August 2, 2016 Filing 211 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #206 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Provide Proof of Representative Status (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CLINE, KEVIN)
July 28, 2016 Filing 210 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #206 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Provide Proof of Representative Status (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CLINE, KEVIN)
July 26, 2016 Filing 209 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BELIA CUELLAR, RONALD D. GOGLEY, HERBERT R. GRAY, GLORETTA V MAGEE, JUANITA A. QUALLS(3:14-cv-07342), RODNEY D. QUALLS, DANIEL RIEDLE, WINIFRED W. RIEDLE, MARY E. ROSS, NICOLAS TOSCANO, DOROTHY E WHITE re #206 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Provide Proof of Representative Status (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BARRECA, RICK)
July 22, 2016 Filing 208 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JIMMY BARNES, Gerald Bibby, DEAN L. GUTTERIDGE, TAMMY M. GUTTERIDGE, EDWIN L KUNTZ, JUNE M KUNTZ, CLEO J. LASITER, PATRICIA A. LASITER, IKE MORRIS, CARRIE M. PLANKS, GREGORY TALLEY, JOYCE A. TALLEY re #206 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Provide Proof of Representative Status (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
July 21, 2016 Filing 207 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BILL FLEMMING re #206 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Provide Proof of Representative Status (BEASLEY, BARRETT)
July 10, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #206 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Provide Proof of Representative Status. Motion set for 8/1/2016 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (eaj)
July 8, 2016 Filing 206 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Failure to Provide Proof of Representative Status by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CLINE, KEVIN)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER denying #199 Defendants' Motion for order enforcing discovery agreements. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/29/2016. (eaj)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Reinstating Claims of Plaintiff Aubrey R. Harris. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/27/2016. (mmh)
June 27, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Status Conference held on 6/27/2016. In-Person Status Conference set for 8/18/2016 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. (DIGITALLY RECORDED (mm)
June 27, 2016 Filing 203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Motion Hearing held on 6/27/2016 re #199 MOTION for Order Enforcing Discovery Agreements filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. Court Ordered Motion is Denied; Order to be filed, Status Conference held on 6/27/2016, (In-Person Status Conference set for 8/18/2016 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (Court Reporter/Recorder Vincent Russoniello.) (jg, )
June 22, 2016 Filing 202 RESPONSE re #201 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(FAUVRE, DAVID)
June 17, 2016 Filing 201 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #199 MOTION for Order Enforcing Discovery Agreements (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(FAUVRE, DAVID)
June 13, 2016 Filing 200 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by STATE OF HAWAII re #199 MOTION for Order Enforcing Discovery Agreements (eaj)
May 30, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #199 MOTION for Order Enforcing Discovery Agreements . Motion set for 6/20/2016 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (eaj)
May 27, 2016 Filing 199 MOTION for Order Enforcing Discovery Agreements by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(FAUVRE, DAVID)
May 12, 2016 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by RICK BARRECA on behalf of IRENE S. VILLEGAS (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(BARRECA, RICK)
May 12, 2016 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by RICK BARRECA on behalf of RUBY M BURT (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(BARRECA, RICK)
May 12, 2016 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by RICK BARRECA on behalf of DONALD W. BEENE, ELLEN C. BEENE, PATRICIA BRENDLEN, ELIZABETH M. DAVIDSON(14-7342), JIMMY R. DEARMON(3:14-cv-07342), FANNY ECKER, JOHN ECKER, CRAIG FASLER, KATHY FASLER, CHARLOTTE H. GRANT, GWENDOLYN D. JACKSON, RONALD JACKSON, RONALD JACKSON, GRACIE M. SEATS, RUBY SMITH, BARBARA J. STEWART(3:14-cv-7342), HARRY M. STEWART, CHARLOTTE WALLER, ELLIOT WALLS (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(BARRECA, RICK)
May 10, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Status Conference held on 5/10/2016. Status Conference set for 6/27/2016 at 10:00 A.M. (mm)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION AND ORDER Voluntarily Dismissing claims brought by Plaintiffs Bernard Milowitz and Barbara Grinkovich with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/10/2016. (km)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs, Lynette Hawkins, Phyllis Oswiecinski, Consolation Shaffer, Anna Anderson and Kenneth Grove (Civil Action 14-4637). Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/3/2016. (eaj)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding Plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A & B. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/10/2016. (eaj)
May 10, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 5/10/2016. Status Conference set for 6/27/2016 at 10:00 A.M. (jg, )
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MDL ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs claims are Dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/3/2016. (km) (km)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff JAMES BROWN'S Complaint. (15-399). Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/3/2016. (eaj)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-37) transferring certain action to this court. (dm)
March 17, 2016 Filing 189 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney DANIEL C. BURKE terminated. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(BURKE, DANIEL)
March 17, 2016 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL S. WERNER on behalf of Kenneth Petit (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(WERNER, MICHAEL)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 SECOND AMENDED MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/15/2016. (eaj)
March 8, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Status Conference held on 3/8/2016. Plaintiffs will be submitting a revised schedule. Status Conference set for 5/10/2016 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5W before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. (mm)
March 8, 2016 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Kristin Mykulak has designated as confidential materials and restricted access to the Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to case #186 filed on 3/8/2016. This document does not appear to be the subject of a motion or order. Please submit a certification stating that this document is to be marked Confidential Material or that this document's access was restricted in error. Please be advised, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3, you must file a motion for leave to have a document sealed. (eaj)
March 8, 2016 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 3/8/2016, ( Status Conference set for 5/10/2016 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jg, )
March 8, 2016 Filing 186 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney MONICA NICOLE WATSON terminated. (MYKULAK, KRISTIN)
March 8, 2016 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by GERARD RYAN, III on behalf of Kenneth Petit (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions)(RYAN, GERARD)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-36) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
February 23, 2016 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by RICK BARRECA on behalf of Beverly Arcement, Gerald J. Arcement, DARRIA BROWN, Mary R. Bozarth, DEIDRA GARRETT, BILL GILLIAM, THOMAS J. MILLER, JEREMY C. ROBINSON, ROBERTA ROSEN, LESA SCIONEAUX, ANNETTE SEARGEANT, TERRY A. SHELTON (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(BARRECA, RICK)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Voluntary Stipulation and ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/16/2016. (eaj)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Plaintiffs listed on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/10/2016. (eaj)
February 10, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 2/10/2016, ( Status Conference set for 4/7/2016 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jg, )
February 10, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: In-Person Status Conference held on 2/10/2016. (mm)
February 4, 2016 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by RICK BARRECA on behalf of HARLAN F. ADDINGTON, GRANT L BENNETT, MILTON R BRADSHAW, CAROL CHAIKEN, IRWIN CHAIKEN, DIANE L COLVIN, BARBARA CRISWELL, MATTIE L DAVIS, ANN M DREW, CLARENCE DREW, ELIZABETH FERRENTINO, ROBERT FERRENTINO, JACKIE GEDEON, CHARLES E GILL, DELORES M GILL, GLORIA HORTON, RANDALL E HORTON, GLORETTA V MAGEE, RICHARD P MASON, BRENDA MASTERS, CHARLES R MASTERS, ROBERT L MCGRIFF, KATHRYN MYERS, RONALD P MYERS, ROBERT L NOLAND, VIRGINIA L NOLAND, MAUREEN J PATT, ROBERT J PATT, JOHN T PETROVICH, PATRICIA PETROVICH, GARY PHELPS, NANCY L PHELPS, BRIAN R REDMOND, SUSAN G REDMOND, LINDA D REHMERT, PAUL E REHMERT, DOROTHY E WHITE, ELIZABETH A WORRELL, WILLIAM H WORRELL (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(BARRECA, RICK)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 LETTER ORDER that the parties have until 2/6/2016 to submit a joint status report. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/4/2016. (eaj)
December 22, 2015 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by RICK BARRECA on behalf of JERI KLEIN (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(BARRECA, RICK)
December 22, 2015 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by RICK BARRECA on behalf of SERAPHENE BARASH, ROY D. BLAND, SUSAN L. BLAND, ELIZABETH BURKETT, WILLIAM J. BURKETT, BEVERLY BURTON, MICHAEL BURTON, ERIC COHEN, PATRICIA COHEN, ELLA J. COX (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(BARRECA, RICK)
December 22, 2015 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by RICK BARRECA on behalf of GARY ARMANTROUT, NANCY K. ARMANTROUT, ICEL M. BARTLEY, MAX L. BARTLEY, JERRY J. BASS, CHESTER L. BIRT, VIRGINIA M. BIRT, CLARENCE A. BLEVINS, HOLLY BLEVINS, CLAUDE A. BUGBEE, JOSEPH P. CONNORS, JOSEPH B. DIGILIO, LEON R. DORSEY, SHIRLEY DORSEY, CATHERINE E. DUNN, NERLANDE ETIENNE, JAMES D. FALLON, VICKIE FALLON, LORETT FENT, ROBERT J. FENT, MARIA M. GARCIA, RICKY D. GARRISON, JOYCE A. GOGLEY, RONALD D. GOGLEY, RAIFORD L. GRIGSBY, BARBARA GRINKOVICH, JOE L. HAILE, CHARLES HENDERSON, DEBRA HENDERSON, DONNA J. HOPKINS, ROGER D. HOPKINS, JEANNETTE IRBY, DEBRA IZZO, RALPH IZZO, PEGGY JACOBS, THEODORE R. JORDAN, WANDA JORDAN, BARBARA A. KRAKLIO, WALLACE R. KRAKLIO, JUANITA LANDRUM, BILLY V. LEWIS, JOY A. LONG, MARY LOVEDAY, DONALD R. MABES, REBECCA J. MABES, GEORGE MAVRONIS, CONNIE MCMULLEN, RONALD R. MCMULLEN, ANDREA S. MICHAUD, HENRY R. MICHAUD, CAROL E. MILNIKEL, BERNARD E. MILOWITZ, BRADLEY MORTICHESKY, JACKIE MORTICHESKY, ELIZABETH L. MOSLEY, GLORIA A. MUMM, PATRICIA L. PAIRAN, MARIE M. PERRIN, RONALD PIOTEREK, DORINDA J. POLLOCK, NANCY RENSHAW, THOMAS B. SQUIRES, SANGEETHA SRINIVASAN, BERNICE M. STANLEY, WILLIAM J. STANLEY, BARRY STICKER, ROBERT L. TAYLOR, ROZANNE TAYLOR, KATHERINE TOSCANO, NICOLAS TOSCANO, DEBORAH A. VALERI, PATRICIA M. WATKINS, MARY YARBER, NOBLE YEOMAN, CHARLES YOUNG, CLAUDETTE YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(BARRECA, RICK)
December 15, 2015 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by RICK BARRECA on behalf of ALICE AARON, PHILLIP D. AARON, DARNELLA ABRAMS, BOBBY AGEE, JUDY BROWN, Lavelle Billip, Mary Jo Bolton, Ralph E. Bolton, CATHERINE ELDERKIN, JACK W. ELDERKIN, ROBERT M. GIBBS, TAMMY M. GUTTERIDGE, JEFFREY D. HALE, LILLIE HALE, RALPH T. HARDEN, ALLAN D. JARED, MARIAN A. JARED, MARIE E. JIMENEZ, THEODORE R. JIMENEZ, BETTY SUE LEE, LOUIS LEE, LINDA C. LEWIS, KAREN L. LIPSKY, MARK A. LIPSKY, DEROTHA LITTLE, YOLANDA LOPEZ, JAMES E. LYTLE, JOY D. LYTLE, GLORIA J. MCCOIN, ROENA C. PATTERSON, LUCY A. RANDOLPH, DANIEL RIEDLE, WINIFRED W. RIEDLE, MARY E. ROSS, LANNY S. SHANE, RONIT SHANE, SARAH R. THOMAS, ANN TINGLER, SAMUEL L. TINGLER, MICHAEL TRIPLETT, BARBARA WARREN, ROY A. WARREN, FRANK D. WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(BARRECA, RICK)
December 10, 2015 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Status Conference held on 12/10/2015. Status Conference set for 2/10/2016 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.(mm)
December 10, 2015 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by SHAYNA E. SACKS on behalf of ADRIEN L. ADAMS, ANNIE ADAMS, AMANDA C. BAKER, Kesler Blair, ARMAND B. COMO, JUDITH COMO, PATRICIA HOUGH(13-5414), PHYLLIS MILLER(14-1264), Bernice L. Martin, ALICE F. NEWTON, HAYDEN RICHARDSON(14-1264), ALAN M. STEARNS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
December 10, 2015 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 12/10/2015, ( Status Conference set for 2/10/2016 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jg, )
December 10, 2015 Filing 173 Transfer Order from MDL Panel transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 21 Motion (in Civil No. 14-5410) to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney BARRETT BEASLEY terminated as to Plaintiff DAWARI DAN-HARRY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/3/2015. (mmh)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 34 Motion (in case No. 13cv4521) to Substitute Party; Julaine Vigil, in her capacity as the personal representative of the Estate of Eugene R. Vigil, Deceased is substituted in as the primary Plaintiff in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/3/2015. (mmh)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 41 Motion to Substitute Party in 13cv4518; Geoffrey W. Frost, in his capacity as the personal representative of the Estate of George F. Frost, III, Deceased is substituted in as the primary Plaintiff in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/3/2015. (mmh)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Reinstating Claims of Plaintiff Gary Kauffman re: 3:15-cv-804. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/18/2015. (mmh)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER dismissing Plaintiffs James McAleese (3:13-cv-991) and Marcella Chesney (3:13-cv-1036) for Failure to Provide Plaintiff Profile Forms and Proof of Representative Status. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/13/2015. (mmh)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 AMENDED MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4 as to Fact Discovery dates, Expert Discovery, Early Summary Judgment, and Pretrial and Trial Dates. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/12/2015. (kas, )
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4 as to Fact Discovery dates, Expert Discovery, Early Summary Judgment and Pretrial and Trial Dates. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/12/2015. (kas, )
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 LETTER ORDER extending the deadline to submit a letter brief on the issues until 11/13/2015; Defendants responsive letter brief due 11/20/2015. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/2/2015. (eaj)
October 28, 2015 Filing 164 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney MICHAEL S. WERNER terminated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BURKE, DANIEL)
October 28, 2015 Filing 163 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney GARY P. FALKOWITZ terminated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BURKE, DANIEL)
October 28, 2015 Reset Hearings: In-Person Status Conference rescheduled to 12/10/2015 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. (jg, )
October 20, 2015 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 10/20/2015, ( In Person Status Conference set for 11/20/2015 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jg, )
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 13-cv-4518, 13-cv-4521, 13-cv-4516 and 13-cv-4519. The claims brought by those Spouse Plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A (attached) are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/20/2015. (mmh)
October 20, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: In Person Status Conference held on 10/20/2015. (mm)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Reinstating Claims of Maria Samudio (Civil Action No. 15-1028). Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/14/2015. (eaj)
October 6, 2015 Filing 160 NOTICE by Marcella Chesney(13-1036), Kenneth Petit Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel of Michael S. Werner, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BURKE, DANIEL)
October 6, 2015 Filing 159 NOTICE by Marcella Chesney Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel of Gary P. Falkowitz, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BURKE, DANIEL)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting leave to withdraw as counsel (Civil Action No. 15-464). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/6/2015. (eaj)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting leave to withdraw as counsel (Civil Action No. 15-462). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/6/2015. (eaj)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting leave to withdraw as counsel (Civil Action No. 15-403). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/6/2015. (eaj)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting leave to withdraw as counsel (Civil Action No. 15-399). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/6/2015. (eaj)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting leave to withdraw as counsel (Civil Action No. 14-4637). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/6/2015. (eaj)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting leave to withdraw as counsel (Civil Action No. 14-4637). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/6/2015. (eaj)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting leave to withdraw as counsel (Civil Action No. 14-4637). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/6/2015. (eaj)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting leave to withdraw as counsel (Civil Action No. 14-4637). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/6/2015. (eaj)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting leave to withdraw as counsel (Civil Action No. 15-371). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/6/2015. (eaj)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Claims of Plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A and B. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/25/2015. (eaj)
September 22, 2015 Filing 148 NOTICE of Change of Address by KEVIN CLINE (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CLINE, KEVIN)
September 2, 2015 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 9/2/2015, ( Status Conference set for 10/20/2015 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jg, )
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #13 Defendants Motion to Dismiss; Dismissing Plaintiff's claims with prejudice (Civil Action No. 15-1801). Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/1/2015. (eaj)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER dismissing all claims of the following Discovery Pool Plaintiffs: Wesley N. Byrd, Jr. (15-553), David Cross (15-633) and Maria Samudio (15-1028). Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/31/2015. (jjc) Modified on 9/8/2015 (dm).
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION AND ORDER (14-1262 and 14-6874) that Plaintiffs' counsel shall have 60 days from the date the Court approves this stipulation to serve Defendants; that each Plaintiff shall move to substitute the proper party no later than the date he serves Representative Documents and a PPF. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/29/2015. (jjc) Modified on 7/30/2015 (gxh).
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Limiting Third-Party Witness Fees. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/22/2015. (eaj)
July 20, 2015 Filing 143 STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROVIDE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORMS by SHIRLEY ESTER(Individually and as successor-in-interest on behalf of the Estate of Freggie Mack/ 13-5414), SHIRLEY ESTER(individually and as Representative of the Estate of Freggie Mack, deceased/ 14-1264), NADER GHAIDI(14-1264), NADER GHAIDI(13-5414), ROSEMARIE LOWE(14-1264), ROSEMARIE LOWE(13-5414), JOSEPH MALANCONE, FELICIA THOMAS(individually and as successor-in-interest on behalf of the Estate of Dolly Thomas/ 13-5414), FELICIA THOMAS(14-1264), SEMETRA THOMAS(14-1264), SEMETRA THOMAS(13-5414), PATRICK VIGIL(13-5414), PATRICK VIGIL(14-1264), RAY WHORTON(13-5414), RAY WHORTON(14-1264). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
July 20, 2015 Filing 142 STIPULATION of Dismissal by SHIRLEY ESTER(Individually and as successor-in-interest on behalf of the Estate of Freggie Mack/ 13-5414), SHIRLEY ESTER(individually and as Representative of the Estate of Freggie Mack, deceased/ 14-1264), REBECCA FARR, NADER GHAIDI(14-1264), NADER GHAIDI(13-5414), KAREN KELLEY, JOSEPH MALANCONE, FELICIA THOMAS(individually and as successor-in-interest on behalf of the Estate of Dolly Thomas/ 13-5414), FELICIA THOMAS(14-1264), SEMETRA THOMAS(14-1264), SEMETRA THOMAS(13-5414), PATRICK VIGIL(13-5414), PATRICK VIGIL(14-1264), RAY WHORTON(13-5414), RAY WHORTON(14-1264). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
July 20, 2015 Filing 141 STATEMENT PURSUANT TO L.CIV.R. 7.1(d)(4) REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROVIDE PROFILE FORMS by AMOS EDELBOIM(individually, and as Personal Representative on behalf of the Estate of Ehud Lublini, Deceased/ 14-5410), NORMA HAVILAND(14-5410), JAMES FRANKLIN JONES(14-5410), GUILLERMO MEJICO(14-5410), SYLVESTER PROTHRO(14-5410), JACQUELINE STARR(14-5410), TONY WALLS(14-5410), Gertie Wright. (BEASLEY, BARRETT)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding the submission of PPF's and PFS's by replacement Discovery Pool Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/30/2015. (eaj)
June 30, 2015 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 6/30/2015, ( In Person Status Conference set for 9/2/2015 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jg, )
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Granting Defendants Motions to Dismiss for Failure to Provide Plaintiff Profile Forms as to Plaintiffs Francis Jones, Sharon Siedel, Gregory Slater and Clyde E. Workman. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/26/2015. (eaj)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendants withdraw their motion to dismiss as to Plaintiff Eugene Thomas and the final dismissal order against Eugene Thomas is vacated and his case is reinstated. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/11/2015. (mmh)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 (VACATED) ORDER granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Provide Plaintiff Profile Forms; Dismissing all claims of Plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/8/2015. (eaj) Modified on 6/12/2015 to indicate vacated per #138 Stipulation and Order (gxh).
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER DISMISSING all claims of the Plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A; further Ordering that the cases designated with an asterisk in Exhibit A are administratively terminated. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/18/2015. (eaj)
May 18, 2015 Reset Hearings: Please be advised the In-Person Status Conference scheduled for 5/27/2015 is adjourned to 6/30/2015 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Please provide the Court with an updated Status letter. (jg, )
April 16, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee as to EMILY MAY $ 150, receipt number TRE055894 (km, )
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Granting #129 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/6/2015. (kas, )
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Order of MDL Panel (Transfer Order) transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )
April 3, 2015 Filing 133 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #129 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CLINE, KEVIN)
March 27, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Status Conference held on 3/27/2015. (mm)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Plaintiffs listed on Exhibit A, none of whom have served a PPF on Defendants shall serve a PPF by 5/11/2015. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/27/2015. (eaj)
March 27, 2015 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 3/27/2015, ( Status Conference set for 5/27/2015 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.). (jg, )
March 26, 2015 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by GAVIN J. ROONEY on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Emily May. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/23/2015. (eaj)
March 18, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #129 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion set for 4/20/2015 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
March 18, 2015 Filing 129 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PAUL DARRAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BEASLEY, BARRETT)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #120 Plaintiff Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Plaintiff John Cannon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/10/2015. (eaj)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Special Master: PETER H. WOODIN appointed.. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/9/2015. (eaj)
March 6, 2015 Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/27/2015 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. (jg, )
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3: Designating Shayna E. Sacks as Plaintiff's Liaison Counsel to coordinate with and facilitate communications among Plaintiffs' counsel in this litigation. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/4/2015. (eaj)
February 18, 2015 Reset Hearings: Status Conference previously scheduled for 2/25/2015 is rescheduled to 3/5/2015 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. (jg, )
February 10, 2015 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - TO ALL COUNSEL: Please refrain from filing new actions directly into this case, which serves as the Lead Case for MDL 2418. Please file all new actions separately in 3:33-1, where they will then be given individual case numbers. Thank you. (dm )
February 9, 2015 Filing 125 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6203202) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARY JOE GRIFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BURKE, DANIEL) 15-1077 (FLW/TJB) Modified on 2/10/2015 (dm).
February 9, 2015 Filing 124 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6203199) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Connie Good. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BURKE, DANIEL) 15-1076 (FLW/TJB) Modified on 2/10/2015 (dm).
February 9, 2015 Filing 123 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6203185) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Joseph Bozzell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BURKE, DANIEL) 15-1075 (FLW/TJB) Modified on 2/10/2015 (dm).
January 20, 2015 Filing 122 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. regarding re #120 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . (ROONEY, GAVIN)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-31) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
January 6, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #120 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 2/2/2015 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
January 6, 2015 Filing 120 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JOHN CANNON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BEASLEY, BARRETT)
December 9, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: In-Person Conference held on 12/8/2014.
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER that if Plaintiffs have not served exhibit A it must be done by 2/9/2015. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/8/2014. (eaj) Modified on 12/19/2014 (dm).
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 LETTER ORDER that in light of the In-Person Conference scheduled to take place on 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM, the telephone conference scheduled for 12/5/2014 at 12:00 noon is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/24/2014. (eaj)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-29) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the deadline to file individual single-plaintiff complaints is extended an additional 60 days to 2/9/2015. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/21/2014. (eaj)
November 13, 2014 Filing 115 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff Thomas Beecher by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 10, 2014 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone Conference held on 11/10/2014. (jg, )
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Amending Case Management Order No. 2, and setting an In-Person Conference for 12/8/2014 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson.(dm )
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 LETTER ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for 12/5/2014 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni to discuss whether a protective order should be entered limiting Defendants production of sales call notes to detailing visits to doctors who actually prescribed Plavix to each of the Plaintiffs in this nationwide litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/6/2014. (eaj)
October 31, 2014 Filing 112 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6025662) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Walter Jewer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BURKE, DANIEL) Modified on 11/3/2014 CV 14-6874 FLW/TJB (mj).
October 31, 2014 Filing 111 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6025533) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Dennis Ekstedt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BURKE, DANIEL) Modified on 11/3/2014 CV 14-6873 FLW/TJB (mj).
October 30, 2014 Filing 110 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6022981) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Thomas Adams, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BEASLEY, BARRETT) Modified on 11/3/2014 CV 14-6872 FLW/TJB(mj).
October 29, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by SHAYNA E. SACKS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(SACKS, SHAYNA)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 LETTER ORDER extending production deadline to 11/7/2014 for certain Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/27/2014. (eaj)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 LETTER ORDER regarding electronically stored information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/9/2014. (eaj)
October 9, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 10/9/2014. (mm)
October 8, 2014 Filing 106 Corrected Exhibits to #91 Case Management Order No. 2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(eaj)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 AMENDED MDL ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's motion for remand; Denying as to Civil Action No's. 14-1262, 14-1264 and 13-5414. The remainder of the above-captioned cases are remanded to the California Superior Court located in San Francisco, California. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/2/2014. (mmh)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the #53 Motion to Remand; Denying as to Civil Action No's. 13-1262, 13-1264 and 13-5414. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/1/2014. (eaj)
October 1, 2014 Filing 103 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/1/2014. (eaj)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Vacating the Remand Order and Opinion filed 9/12/2014. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/12/2014. (eaj)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Remand; Ordering that the above listed cases are remanded to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for the purpose of remanding the cases to the California State Superior Court, San Francisco Division. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/12/2014. (eaj)
September 12, 2014 Filing 100 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/12/2014. (eaj) .
September 12, 2014 Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 9/12/2014. Update regarding document protocol to be informally provided to the Court following the meeting which is to be scheduled. (DIGITALLY RECORDED) (mm)
August 29, 2014 Filing 98 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel re discovery issues. (EZRIN, JOSHUA)
August 28, 2014 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - This message is in reference to the Complaint filed by BARRETT BEASLEY on 8/28/2014. When filing an initial Complaint, please use the fictitious case number (33-1) to file, even if it belongs in an MDL. Once the case is received, it will be assigned a case number and then consolidated into the MDL. The Complaint filed today has been deleted from the main case and will be reopened by the Clerk under a separate case number. This message is for informational purposes only. (eaj)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3: Ordering that all attorneys are obligated to become ECF Users as stated in this Order by 10/10/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/27/2014. (eaj)
August 21, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE by Ardean Lowery re #53 MOTION to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REMAND (EZRIN, JOSHUA)
August 15, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE by ELIZABETH ABNEY, JAMES AIKEN, Irving K. Arenberg, Michael A. Arnold, John Belinda, Bennie Burman, Vertus Corkerin, George Dillard, MICHAEL FARMER, Damon Kaluza, Sr, Sandra L. Kinney, Ardean Lowery, Iris Meeks, Jack Olmstead, GEORGE ROBINSON, Wauneta Raynor, Ravy Vanny, Virgil Walden, Jr re #53 MOTION to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REMAND Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
August 13, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by GAVIN J. ROONEY on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 LETTER ORDER that the parties are to submit a status report to this Court by 8/29/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/7/2014. (eaj)
July 28, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service)(SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2: Telephone Conference set for 10/9/2014 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, Defendant is to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/25/2014. (eaj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2014: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (eaj, ).
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-27) transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )
July 1, 2014 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: In Person Status Conference held on 7/1/2014. Case management and Special Master proposal taken under advisement. The parties are to report back to the Court no later than 8/5/2014, with a written status update regarding document protocol agreement. (DIGITALLY RECORDED) (mm)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-26) transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 LETTER ORDER Scheduling an In-Person Conference on 7/1/2014 at 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Any party wishing to have its position regarding a discovery plan considered must appear in-person before the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/23/2014. (kas)
June 19, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 6/19/2014. (mm)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 LETTER ORDER confirming a Telephone Conference set for 6/19/2014 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/10/2014. (eaj)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-25) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-24) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER that Defendants' document production protocol is approved and shall be implemented in this matter going forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/17/2014. (jjc)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Stipulated Protective Order of Confidentiality. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/11/2014. (eaj)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-23) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-22) transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-21) transferring certain action to this court. (dm)
January 28, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by MONICA NICOLE KAMISON on behalf of All Defendants (KAMISON, MONICA)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-20) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 LETTER ORDER setting a briefing schedule for the submission of Defendants' motion concerning discovery protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/16/2014. (eaj) Modified on 1/28/2014 (dm).
January 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 1/16/2014. (mm)
January 8, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: In Person Conference held on 1/8/2014. (mm)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-19) transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ORDER An in-person status conference is set for January 8, 2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. As previously instructed IT experts are required to be present. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order of MDL Panel transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-17) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
November 19, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by MONICA NICOLE KAMISON on behalf of All Defendants (KAMISON, MONICA)
November 15, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE by Ravy Vanny re #53 MOTION to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REMAND Notice of Supplemental Authority (EZRIN, JOSHUA)
November 8, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 11/8/2013. (mm)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TEXT ORDER - Status Conference via telephone set for November 8, 2013 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. It shall be defendants responsibility to contact all counsel to set up the conference as, well as, to initiate the call. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Remand Motion #53 and the Parties' briefing on the motion and any Order of this Court issued thereon, shall apply to the 19 recently transferred Plavix actions and to the additional Plavix cases filed by these Plaintiffs' counsel that are transferred from the Northern District of California to the MDL. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/21/2013. (eaj).
October 17, 2013 Filing 67 Letter from Monica N. Watson re #65 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in), #60 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in), #53 MOTION to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REMAND, #55 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KAMISON, MONICA)
October 4, 2013 Filing 66 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney REBECCA BETH VISVADER terminated. (HARRIS, DAVID)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order of MDL Panel transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )
September 30, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Status Conference held on 9/30/2013. (mm)
September 27, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE by ELIZABETH ABNEY, JAMES AIKEN, Irving K. Arenberg, Michael A. Arnold, John Belinda, Bennie Burman, Vertus Corkerin, George Dillard, MICHAEL FARMER, Damon Kaluza, Sr, Sandra L. Kinney, Ardean Lowery, Iris Meeks, Jack Olmstead, GEORGE ROBINSON, Wauneta Raynor, Ravy Vanny, Virgil Walden, Jr submitting Supplemental Authority in Support of California State Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 TEXT ORDER - The Court has received a number of requests from counsel wishing to appear telephonically to the September 30, 2013 In Person Conference before Judge Bongiovanni. Parties wishing to appear via telephone shall contact the Court before close of business on Friday, September 27, 2013. If the Court grants a request, the attorney is instructed to coordinate any telephonic appearance in conjunction with the lead Plaintiff's counsel prior to the 2:00pm In Person Conference. All parties shall be held to any schedules entered by the Court regardless of their presence. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-12) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 LETTER ORDER that an In Person Conference is set for 9/30/2013 at 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni; Scheduling Proposals are to be submitted by 9/26/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/16/2013. (eaj)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-11) transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )
September 3, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. submitting Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Defendants' Opposition to California State Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(HARRIS, DAVID)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #4 Defendants motion for Reconsideration of parts of the transferor courts 1/30/2012 decision; denying #10 Relators Motion for Suggestion of Remand; Ordering that the prior decision to Deny Defendants' Motion to Dismiss with respect to Relators False Claims Act claims under Medicaid and Medicare Part D is VACATED; Ordering that Defendants motion to dismiss the False Claims Act claims in the Second Amended Complaint with respect to Medicaid and Medicare Part D is GRANTED; Ordering that Relator is granted leave to file a Third Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/21/2013. (eaj)
August 21, 2013 Filing 57 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ELIZABETH ABNEY, JAMES AIKEN, Irving K. Arenberg, Michael A. Arnold, John Belinda, Bennie Burman, Vertus Corkerin, George Dillard, MICHAEL FARMER, Damon Kaluza, Sr, Sandra L. Kinney, Ardean Lowery, Iris Meeks, Jack Olmstead, GEORGE ROBINSON, Wauneta Raynor, Ravy Vanny, Virgil Walden, Jr re #53 MOTION to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REMAND (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hunter Jay Shkolnik, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Certificate of Service)(SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
August 16, 2013 Filing 56 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. re #53 MOTION to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REMAND (Attachments: #1 Certification of David L. Harris, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Declaration Ammie McAsey, #13 Certificate of Service)(HARRIS, DAVID)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order of MDL Panel transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )
July 29, 2013 Set Deadlines as to #53 MOTION to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REMAND. Motion set for 8/19/2013 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
July 26, 2013 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Joshua C. Ezrin re #53 MOTION to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REMAND by Ardean Lowery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 12, #2 Exhibit 13 - 14, #3 Exhibit 15 - 16, #4 Exhibit 17 - 18, #5 Exhibit 19 - 20, #6 Exhibit 21 - 22, #7 Exhibit 23 - 24, #8 Exhibit 25 - 26, #9 Exhibit 27 - 28, #10 Exhibit 29 - 35, #11 Exhibit 36 - 37, #12 Exhibit 38 - 39, #13 Exhibit 40 - 42, #14 Exhibit 43, #15 Exhibit 44 - 46)(EZRIN, JOSHUA)
July 26, 2013 Filing 53 MOTION to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REMAND by Ardean Lowery. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(EZRIN, JOSHUA)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-10) transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1: Ordering that this Order shall govern the practice and procedure in: (a) the actions transferred to this Court by the Panel pursuant to its order of February 12, 2013 (Transfer Order), (b) any tag-along actions transferred to this Court by the Panel, and (c) all related actions filed directly in this Court or transferred or removed to this Court; Ordering all papers filed shall bear the identification Docket No. 13-CV-02418-FLW-TJB; Ordering all documents are to be electronically filed; Defendants Lead Counsel shall be Anand Agneshwar of Arnold & Porter LLP; Ordering Oral Argument will be held on Defendants' Motion for Partial Reconsideration and Plaintiffs Motion for suggestion of Remand in No. 3:13-cv-1039, and on Plaintiffs Motion to remand in 3:13-CV-1603 on 8/21/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5E, U.S. Courthouse, 402 East State Street, Trenton, NJ 08608. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/16/2013. (eaj)
July 16, 2013 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please Note the correct date for the Motion hearing is August 21, 2013 at 10:00. #50 (jg, )
July 12, 2013 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held on 7/12/2013. Court set Motion hearing date of 8-21-13 at 10:00 for various motions. (jg, ) Modified on 7/16/2013 (jg).
July 10, 2013 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT by Robert J Budz. (SCHAUB, SCOTT)
July 8, 2013 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT by Irving K. Arenberg, Michael A. Arnold, John Belinda, Bennie Burman, Sandra L. Kinney. (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
July 8, 2013 Filing 47 STATUS REPORT dated July 8, 2013 by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Joint Proposed Case Management Order I), #2 Certificate of Service)(HARRIS, DAVID)
July 5, 2013 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. identifying Sanofi as Corporate Parent.. (HARRIS, DAVID)
July 5, 2013 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC identifying Sanofi as Corporate Parent.. (HARRIS, DAVID)
July 5, 2013 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANOFI US SERVICES INC. identifying Sanofi as Corporate Parent.. (HARRIS, DAVID)
July 5, 2013 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. (HARRIS, DAVID)
July 5, 2013 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC..(HARRIS, DAVID)
July 1, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT LYLE SALIM on behalf of Karima Norrise (SALIM, ROBERT)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-9) transferring certain actions from the Northern District of California to this court. (dd, )
June 19, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE OF OPPOSITION by JAMES HOOD re #38 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(eaj)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-8) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MDL LETTER ORDER rescheduling the Organizational Conference to 7/12/2013 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson; that counsel who were directed to submit their Status Reports by 6/6/2013, should still do so; that the Proposed Initial Case Management Order shall be submitted by 7/8/2013; that, for the cases that are currently being transferred, those attys should each submit a Status Report for their case(s) by 7/8/2013. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/6/2013. (gxh)
June 6, 2013 Filing 36 STATUS REPORT by JUDY BROWN, DEROTHA LITTLE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
June 6, 2013 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT by Marcella Chesney, Kenneth Petit. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FALKOWITZ, GARY)
June 6, 2013 Filing 34 STATUS REPORT by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HARRIS, DAVID)
June 6, 2013 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT by Patsy Black, Wilbur Black, Carolyn Sue Buckley, Sue Frisbee-Peek, Mary D Oliver, Calvin Olivier, Cheri Olivier, Janice Olivier, Joseph Olivier, Walter Olivier, Ernesto Releford, Betty Tarver, Rita Touriac, Gerald Waldrop, Wanda Waldrop. (PLYMALE, DOUGLAS)
June 6, 2013 Filing 32 STATUS REPORT OF PLAINTIFF by STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA ex rel. DARRELL V. McGRAW, JR., ATTORNEY GENERAL. (FRANKOVITCH, CARL)
June 6, 2013 Filing 31 STATUS REPORT by CITY OF CHICAGO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, Elisa Dickson, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WISCONSIN, State of New Jersey, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CUETO, CHRISTOPHER)
June 6, 2013 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT by Bill H. Thomas. (BILBO, JIMMY)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order of MDL Panel transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )
June 6, 2013 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT by Darlene Snyder, Raymond Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter to Clerk)(gxh)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT MDL ORDER: Previously, the Court set June 7, 2013, as the date to file counsel's Status Reports and the Proposed Case Management Order. To properly prepare for the Organizational Conference, the Court is amending the filing date for those reports and order to June 6, 2013, by no later than 4:00 pm. Ordered by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/04/2013. (Fang, W)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Scheduling an In-Person Organizational Conference for 6/10/2013 at 01:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Freda L. Wolfson, wherein all counsel are directed to attend; Directing Counsel to submit a Status report of the case(s) they are handling by 6/7/2013; Directing all counsel to confer and submit a proposed initial case-management Order by 6/7/2013. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/22/2013. (eaj)
May 2, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA BETH VISVADER on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(VISVADER, REBECCA)
April 30, 2013 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC. identifying Sanofi as Corporate Parent.. (KAMISON, MONICA)
April 30, 2013 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC identifying Sanofi as Corporate Parent.. (KAMISON, MONICA)
April 30, 2013 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANOFI US SERVICES INC. identifying Sanofi as Corporate Parent.. (KAMISON, MONICA)
April 30, 2013 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. (KAMISON, MONICA)
April 30, 2013 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC..(KAMISON, MONICA)
April 26, 2013 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C., SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC..(gxh)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-5) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-4) transferring certain action to this court. (dm )
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-3) transferring certain actions to this court. (dm)
March 25, 2013 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by CITY OF CHICAGO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, Elisa Dickson, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WISCONSIN, State of New Jersey, United States of America re #10 MOTION to Remand to United State District Court for the Southern District of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(CUETO, CHRISTOPHER)
March 13, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by BLAIR R. LOOCKE on behalf of CITY OF CHICAGO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, Elisa Dickson, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WISCONSIN, State of New Jersey, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(LOOCKE, BLAIR)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order of MDL Panel Lifting Stay as to CTO #2. (dm)
March 11, 2013 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Stay . Motion set for 4/1/2013 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
March 11, 2013 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Remand to United State District Court for the Southern District of Illinois. Motion set for 4/1/2013 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
March 8, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILLIP L. SAMPSON, JR on behalf of CITY OF CHICAGO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, Elisa Dickson, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WISCONSIN, State of New Jersey, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(SAMPSON, PHILLIP)
March 8, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay by CITY OF CHICAGO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, Elisa Dickson, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WISCONSIN, State of New Jersey, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CUETO, CHRISTOPHER)
March 8, 2013 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to United State District Court for the Southern District of Illinois by CITY OF CHICAGO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, Elisa Dickson, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WISCONSIN, State of New Jersey, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Notice that the Government is Not Intervening at this Time, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(CUETO, CHRISTOPHER)
March 5, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by RALPH D. MCBRIDE on behalf of CITY OF CHICAGO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, Elisa Dickson, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WISCONSIN, State of New Jersey, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Plaintiffs, #2 Certificate of Service)(MCBRIDE, RALPH)
March 5, 2013 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Appearance #8 filed by Monica N. Watson on 3/5/2013 requests that the Clerk's office add additional attorneys to receive electronic notices for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account to add these additional email addresses for this case. (eaj)
March 5, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MONICA NICOLE KAMISON on behalf of All Defendants (KAMISON, MONICA)
March 5, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATH A. NOVOSAD on behalf of CITY OF CHICAGO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, Elisa Dickson, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WISCONSIN, State of New Jersey, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(NOVOSAD, HEATH)
March 5, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by TONY L. VISAGE on behalf of CITY OF CHICAGO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, Elisa Dickson, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WISCONSIN, State of New Jersey, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(VISAGE, TONY)
March 4, 2013 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion for Reconsideration #4 filed by Monica Kamison on 2/25/2013 appears to be filed in the incorrect case. PLEASE Refile the Motion in 10-1039, the original file date will be used for setting the Motion. The Calendar event created by this incorrect filing will be terminated. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (eaj)
February 26, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER F. CUETO on behalf of CITY OF CHICAGO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, Elisa Dickson, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WISCONSIN, State of New Jersey, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Certificate of Service)(CUETO, CHRISTOPHER)
February 26, 2013 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Reconsideration . Motion set for 4/1/2013 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj)
February 25, 2013 Filing 4 MOTION for Reconsideration by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of the Transferor Court's January 30, 2013 Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Certificate of Service)(KAMISON, MONICA)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )
February 14, 2013 Filing 2 MDL Notification Letter. (dm )
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Order of MDL Panel transferring certain actions to this court. (dm )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: PLAVIX PRODUCT LIABILITY AND MARKETING LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boyce Glenn
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYRNA PETERS
Represented By: BARRETT BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE JOSEPH
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH F. MEGLINO, SR.
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEGGY R. KENNEDY
Represented By: BARRETT BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIS PISANO
Represented By: DIANE MARIE COFFEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhoden A. Fitzroy
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEMARIE LOWE
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Taylor
Represented By: SETH SHARROCK WEBB
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Medlock
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry E. Ingram, Sr.
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL M. SLAGLE
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH ABNEY
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER ASAD
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN NICHOLAS
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: BARRETT BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA BRADFORD
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Levi West
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOYD HATTON
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAUREEN J PATT
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: RICK BARRECA
Represented By: DIANE MARIE COFFEY
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAH STRAIGHT
Represented By: TAYJES MATTHEW SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHESTER L. BIRT
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: RICK BARRECA
Represented By: DIANE MARIE COFFEY
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rickie Mitchell
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS COLEMAN
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn L. Gillespie
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Kilgore
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eve Daniels
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Pope
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RALPH T. HARDEN
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: RICK BARRECA
Represented By: DIANE MARIE COFFEY
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THEODORE R. JIMENEZ
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: RICK BARRECA
Represented By: DIANE MARIE COFFEY
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH PARTAIN
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKI L. WALLACE
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS OSWIECINSKI
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: BARRETT BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDDIE BARKSDALE
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Kastor
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: BARRETT BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENEVA K. BELLINGER
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Boardley
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEARL C. HARVEY
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Jessica You Lee
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS STASIAK
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE SMITH
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE RASBAND
Represented By: BARRETT BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoland Stafford
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathaleen Jones
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHY SCIARA
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy A. Skorik
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA J. TINGLEY
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lewis
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: BARRETT BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Walker
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY L. JOHNSON
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENNA BAYS
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RALPH LANDOLFI, SR.
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Craig
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN VIGIL
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dade
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL FARMER
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret F. Reynolds
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Ann Smith
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMA RAGSDALE
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILBERT ORTIZ
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SRINIVASAN DURAIRAJ
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF ARTHENA REDDEN
Represented By: BARRETT BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne D. Sain
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wylie
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARENCE A. BELVINS
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES WRIGHT
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE PRESLEY
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID STOKES
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve A. Panas
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNADETTE J. BENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN JACOBS
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA CASALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT DENNISON
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Christian
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Blocker
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond M. Tandle
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Miller
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Laprad
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY HALBERT
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE WALKER
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFRED T. BOUTWELL
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: KELLY MCMEEKIN
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA GNEWUCH
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A. Wiatrowski
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY GORREVICH
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Snyder Jackson
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY C. HUDNALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Mace
Represented By: Julie Elizabeth O'Shesky
Represented By: LIZETTE RADOVIC
Represented By: JOHN A. VENEZIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH F. KANE
Represented By: DIANE MARIE COFFEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIDNEY SCHNELL
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDITH PFEIFFER
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY L. BRADBERRY
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT J PATT
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: RICK BARRECA
Represented By: DIANE MARIE COFFEY
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Coy
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE MAE BOYD
Represented By: BARRETT BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON LECOUMPTE
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD BURCH
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Osborne
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEFFREY A. TRAVERS
Represented By: Michael Miller
Represented By: NANCY HERSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA M. MCLAUGHLIN
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN BROWN
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Feiman
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Sowers
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUTH LOYD
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M. Knight
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE CANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILBERT PARKER
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONNIE D. MCGUIRE
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELON HALL
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Jessica You Lee
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Oberacker
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Hand
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK MORMUR
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty L. Bannister
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOIS WILLIAMS
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN W. THARP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLINE S. ZERBE
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MODESTO ROQUE
Represented By: BARRETT BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT H. HUMPHREYS
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHY I. SCHACKEL
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER F. CUETO
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: BLAIR R. LOOCKE
Represented By: TONY L. VISAGE
Represented By: PHILLIP L. SAMPSON, JR
Represented By: RALPH D. MCBRIDE
Represented By: HEATH A. NOVOSAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Keith
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE PHILLIPS
Represented By: SHAYNA E. SACKS
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. AUDET
Represented By: JOSHUA CALEB EZRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing |