Bartlett et al v. Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL et al
Plaintiff: Steven W. Hiller, Linda Jones, Marvise L. Crockett, Gilbert Arsiaga, Jr., Robert Bartlett, George Arsiaga, Tracie Arsiaga, Patricia Arsiaga, Sylvia Macias, Jeremy Church, Robi Ann Galindo, Maxine E. Crockett, Matthew Arsiaga, Shawn Bartlett, Ingrid Fisher, Angel Munoz, Terrel Charles Bartlett, Steven Greenwood, Sandra Hankins, Cedric Hunt, Bree Reuben, James Cole, R.M.S., Janet L. Rios, Jason Sackett, Andrew Moores, Johnny Javier Miles, Jr., Casey Reuben, Chasity Wells-George, Anona Gonelli, Matthew Menke, Jeffrey D. Price, John Dana Greer, M.T.W., P.H., Mackenzie G. Hall, David Eugene Hickman, Brian Montogmery, Richard Finken, Johnny Washburn, Gernessoit Jonaus, Virginia Billiter, M.W., Paul D. Harris, I.F., Marcia Kirby, Hilary Westerberg, Zachary Hake, Gladys E. Reyes Centeno, Dwight Martin, Jacqueline A. Smith, Brett Farley, Lisi Aieti, G.B., Gloria P Reynoso, W.H., Nathaniel Foley, G.L., Kathleen Hoke, Mary Catherine McLaughlin, Ardell Thomsen, Andrew Charles Major, Stephanie Kidder, A.Z.-C., Rommel Rocha, Michelle Klemensberg, Kaitlyn Adams, Heather Ann Farkas, Nathan Richards, Paul Mitchell Millican, Francis L. Cote, K.K, Patrick Tutwiler, Joshua Starkey, Allen Swinton, Mariah Simoneaux, Tricia English, Michelle Benavidez, Rebekah Scott, Tammy Vanderwaal, Ashley Wells Simpson, William Ronald Little, Michelle Taylor, Fred Frigo, Lisa Duncan, Danielle Sweet, T.S., Daniel Austin Dixon, Kathy Crabtree, Thomas Niquette, Michael Chand, Jr., Karaleen Herb, Timothy W. Elledge, Douglas Veverka, Lauren Niquette, Debra Mariano, Matthew Lilley, Lidia Sullivan, David Hartley, Michael Mock, Nicole DeBrabander, A.S., Mark Finken, Eric Phye, Andre Brown, Valencia Cook, Eric Neiberger, Dawn Haines, Nathan English, William Justin Weatherly, Cara Roberts, Joseph L. Greer, Tamara Hassler, Kristin Walker, Charles B. Gregston, Theresa Ann Kuhlmeier, Mark E. Thomsen, Velina Sanchez, Carol Benson, Temika Swinton, Leslie K. Reeves-Hardcastle, Maria Alvarez, Patricia Wheatley, Nanette Saenz, Theresa Hart, Jessica Hubbard, Richard Hedgecock, II, Donald Field, Sharen Jonaus Martin, Charles Heinlein, Sr., Jonathan Craig, Daniel Kenney, L.R.-W., J.S.S., Ed Elliott, Andrew Bradley, Jeffrey Anderson, Cynthia Thornsberry, James Shepard, Christopher David, Mark Schichtl, Angelica Andrade, Peter Finken, Daniel Thomas, Sr., Brian J. Casey, Kristin White, Georgianna Stephens-Smith, Richard Lee, M.R.M, Michael Lucas, Charlee Blair Webb, Judy Huenink, Melissa Dressler, Eric Brandon Stoneking, Stacy Pate, T.C., Randall Klingensmith, Amber Hensley, Stephanie Juneau, Veronica Hickman, Andrew Lucas, Joaqina Saenz Chorens, Max W. Hurst, Margarito A. Martinez, Jr., Carrol Alderete, Thomas Smith, Brenda Habsieger, Dianne O'Neill, Christopher Joyner, Glenda Starcevich, Katherine McRill-Fellini, M.D.H., Michele White, Gretchen Lang, John Gibson, Angel Mayes, Sherri C. Holiman, Bradley Starcevich, Ryan Chand, Bridget Juneau, Adam G. Stout, Cameron Farley, Scott Hood, Sandra Valencia, Christina Mahon, Gary Douglas Fishbeck, Nichole Lohrig, Tyler Latham, Eugene Delozier, Silver Farr, J.F., William Farrar,Sr., Judas Recendez, Taylor Eastlund, Christopher Levi, Carrie Sue Stoneking, Summer Stephens, David Kaplan, Shaula Shaffer, Brandie Stanton, Maria E. Calle, Andrew James Raymond, Peggy Carvill-Liguori, Suheil Campbell, Margaret Dudek, Ismael Martir, A.L.R., Megan Mauk, Lorenzo Sandoval, Sr., Jeremy D. Smith, Jeanne Rhea Mcmanus, Kathy Adamson, Erin Lee Dructor, Cana Hickman, Luis Junior Puertas, Monica Arizola, James L. Reeves, Deborah Noble, Jerry A. Palinsky, II, Bryant Bearfield, Tyler Norager, Colleen Czaplicki, Jaydean Hamilton, Sharon Johnston, Ami Neiberger, Donald Tracy, Sheila Tracy, Paula C. Bobb-Miles, Joshua Ryan Nantz, James Kinsey, Karar Alabsawi, James Canine, Holly Burson, Trent Stephens, Kynesha Dhanoolal, Todd Daily, Afonso Bandhold, Stephen Finken, Shalee Norager, Richard Fraser, Richard Tomson, Nicholas Baumhoer, Calvin Canine, John Daggett, Jean Dammann, Charles Vincent, Angela Alvarez, Mark Munns, Diana Thomas, Wayne Brown, Richard E. Hassler, K.M.G., Alan Burks, Wesley Williamson, Michelle West, Laurel Barattieri, Patrick Ward, Katherine M. Crow, C.W., Jonathan Contreras, Sr., Jackie Farrar-Finken, Benjamin Daniel Carrington, Sean Elliott, Ralph Thomsen, Carrie Thompson, Katrina Coe, John D. Lamie, Jennifer Link, Megan People, John O'Neill, Wendy Coleman, Keith Veverka, Sabrina Cumbe, Lawrence Kruger, Jason York, Melba Anne F. Harris, Daphnie Jonaus Martin, J.J.H., Adam magers, Toni Attanasio, Ava Lanette Bradley, Angela M. Garcia, Melinda Flick, Michelle Kim, Evan D. Bogart, Nicholas Prowse, Rene Gutel, Brian G. Taylor, Kimberly Miller, C.L., Paula Menke, Luke Murphy, John Kirby, Larry DiCenzo, Kathy Kugler, Nicole Landon, A.T., Iliana M. Rosa-Valentin, George J. White, Constance Brian, Armando Fuentes, Terrymarie Stanton, Brian Coke, Tatyana Fuentes, David Lucas, Dianna Alldridge, Lauren Shumate, Athena Hall, Ava Tomson, Stephanie Gibson Webster, Anthony Hudson, Shannon Shumate, Rebecca L. Samten-Finch, Jill Hake, Ryan Wilson, Sheryl Ann Chen, Vivian Pickett, Tracy Anderson, James Smith, Joedi Wood, Dennis Dunn, Bruce Lukow, Hunter L. Laird, Emily Adams, I.W., Christopher Golembe, Latasha Marble, H.S., Brittany Hogan, Sebastian Niuman, A.B., Miranda Pruitt, Don Jason Stone, Donna Lewis, Bashar Al-Taie, Pam Marion, Sabrina Chapman, Pamela Adle-Watts, M.B.S., Padraic J. Newman, Linda Gibson, Ricky Jonaus, Russel Hicks, Jr., David Woodward, Kyla Ostenson, K.A., Celeste Yantis, E.W., Rosemarie Alfonso, Kathleen Stephens, Robert W. Kuhlmeier, John Christopher Hicks, Matthew Craig, Shirley Stearns, Deborah Beavers, Sven Eastlund, H.K., Christopher D. Greer, Veronica Denisse Andrade, Tammy Denboer, Ronald Wayne Crabtree, Stephen W. Evans, David Noble, Douglas R. Bogart, Cesar Contreras, Victor Ray Wise II, Nicole B. Stein, Robert Funcheon, Elva Espinoza, Joshua Brooks, Sharon M. Pugh, Robert Canine, Ashley Gudridge Houppert, Amy Lynn Robinson, Shaylyn C. Reece, Donald C. Bandhold, Jeanette West, John P. Sklaney, III, Roady Landtiser, Julie Chism, Tony Gonzalez, Patrick Farr, J.R., K.M., Lola Jean Modjeska, Brandeaux Campbell, Eric Donoho, T.M., K.A.C, Vickie Mchone, Sarah Dudek, Marckendy Jonaus, Gary Lammers, Andrew Dudek, Brian Clark Alldridge, D.D., Margarita Aristizabal, Sean Harrington, Joshua TIffner, Maria Gomez, Nannette Bryne-Haupt, Hernan Contreras, K.L., Matthew Lammers, Patrick O'Neill, Shelby West, Nancy Hecker, Steven Price, Amber Habsieger, Gabriela D. Puertas Vergara-Donoso, Phillip Sanchez, Sean Slaven, William Allmon, William J. Lee, Leasa Dollar, Dixie Flagg, Abigail Hall, Jerry L. Myers, Joanne Sue Hassler, Randolph Freeman, E.R., James Talbert, D.J.F., Frances Catherine Castro, Necole Dunlow Smith, Carol Polley, Joshua Schichtl, Brenda Little, J.T.B., Joseph Lukow, Robert Vaccaro, Jill Ann Bock, Marilyn Louise Tully, Billy Johnson, William Parker, Isabell Vincent, William Witte, Robin Roberts, E.C.R., Kathaleen Freeman, C.F., Matthew Fieser, Kevin Graves, Adam Wood, C.H., Lynn Forehand, Russel York, Helen Fraser, Britney E. Carter, Fran Hinson, G.H., Maximillian Shroyer, Kiersten Hall, Alvis Burns, John David Heath, Richard Casey, Amanda B. Adair, Noel J. Farley, Sr., Tonya Freeman, David James Hicks, Erin Bouten, Edward Kuhlmeier, Carllie Paul, Roberto Andrade, Sr., Lindsay Young, Kristen Galen, Roberto Aaron Arizola, Casey Boehmer, William F. Hecker, Jr., Debra Cook-Russell, Kaytrina Jackson, Jolene Lilley, Michael Dean Moody, Lisa Ramaci, Angel Gomez, Christopher Adamson, Clifford Vaughn, Jessica Cabot, Shelley Ann Smith, Jean Mariano, Christopher Satterfield, Richard Landeck, Brent Hinson, Mackenzie Haines, Ryan Bowman, Cecilia Arizola, Daniel Dressler, Dan Laird, Nicole DiCenzo, John Stearns, Tara Hutchinson, Matthew C. Beatty, Karen Hall, Adrian Sandoval, Floyd Burton Robinson, Seth Tiffner, Ardith Cecil Dressler, L.R., Perry White, N.C.E., L.M., Ryan Sabinish, Joann Alldridge, Melissa Benson, Aloysius Sanchez, Sr., Emily Levi, Joan Henscheid, Steven Vernier, Jr., Walter Bailey, Jonathan Heslop, Tim Lucas, Lee Wolfer, Megan Marie Sabatino, Victoria Hecker, Melissa Doheny, Frances Robinson, David Arnold, S.L.H., Nicole Irwin, Albert Snyder, R.J.S., Wayne Newby, Juan Saenz, Johnny Javier Miles, Sr., Kara Connelly, Brett Coke, Raymond Montgomery, Russell Mason, Daisy Tucker, Jason Robinson, Nichole Garrigus, Joni Ariel Reeves Little, Bayli Vacho, Clifford L. Smith, Jr., Jennifer Renee York, John Taylor, Crystal Tutwiler, Poloka Aieti, Brianna Renee Navejas, S.W., Michael Weatherly, Heath Damon Hobson, Joshua P. Stein, Merlese Pickett, Noni Kaplan, John Kuhlmeier, K.R.G., D.A.S., Jeannine Vaughn, Sylvia Johnson Spencer, Skylar Hake, Robert White, Rikki Lukow, Angeline Jackson, Mario Stanton, Ann Christopher, Kelli D. Hake, Rhonda Beattie, K.E.C, Michael Lukow, Denice York, Mario Bowen, James Dressler, Marilyn Haybeck, David Finken, Victoria Hernandez, Derek Stephens, R.M., Alan Finken, Jennifer Lynn Hunt, Phyllis Taylor, Jesse Williamson, Christopher Miller, Rhonda Haupt, Les Kuglicis, James David Hochstetler, Stephanie Hood, Dakota Smith-Lizotte, Richard Adamson, Kevin Connelly, Daniel P. Benson, Kenny Lee, Christopher Songer, K.B., Jean Pruitt, Rene Pool, Greg Klecker, Daniel Dixon, Nicole A. Kaplan, Jared S. Stevens, John Vacho, J.L., Nancy Cote, Donna Farley, Todd Alldridge, James Higgins, Tonya K. Dressler, Glenn Dale Hicks, Sr., W. Jean Reeves, James Craig Roberts, Andrew Jeffrey Anderson, Edna Luz Burgos, Lillian Hurst, Henry J. Bandhold, Sr., Sharon Y. Dunn Smith, Narciso Melendez, John Watts, J.T., Kira Sikes, Jeffrey C. Mann, Noel S. Farley, Connie Moody, Veronica Lopez Reyes, Christopher Hurst, Jarrett Ward, Kimberlee Austin-Oliver, Hope Elizabeth Veverka, Hyunjung Glawson, Sandra Soliday, Rhett Murphy, Kari Carosella, Chad Farr, Jessalyn Holt, Terrance Peterson, III, Michael Habsieger, Drew Edwards, Anne P. Joyner, Ronald Veverka, John Mcculley, Shyanne Smith-Lizotte, Jordan M. Laird, Kyshia Sutton, Mark Dammann, Frank L. Converse, Robert James Hunt, Mary Carvill, Arifah Hardy, Timothy Newman, Lori Ann McCoy, Jackson Wiley Whiteside, Lori Ann McCormick, David Dixon, Cassie Collins, Tiffany M. Little, Aundra Craig, Katherine Prowse, Peter Hake, Linda David, Matthew Garrigus, Emanuela Florexil, Adrianne Kidd, J.J., John D Hecker, David G. Cardinal, Jr., C.K., Robert Neiberger, Randolph Delbert Nantz, Nancy Umbrell, Adina Palinsky, Matthew Benson, Jackie Stewart, Daniel Carvill, Tom B. Lee, Cheyenne Flagg, Mary Neiberger, Daniel Luckett, Jeremy Blohm, Kacey Gilmore, Danielle Dechaine-Morris, David W. Haines, Seop Kim, Daniel Thomas, Jr., Barbara Farley, Jacob Bauer, Derek Allen Hollcroft, Tanya Suzzette Dressler, Elizabeth Jo Eastlund, Veronica Pena Andrade, Chaquita Talbert, Barbara Lammers, Lavonna Harper, T.B., Rachelle Idol, A.S.E., K.A.C., Kathleen Gramkowski, Adam Mattis, R.N.S., Kedrick Dante Moody, Curtis Glawson, Sr., Rhett Stephens, Maricel Murray, Senovia Field, Joshua Denman, Rayanne Hunter, David C. Iverson, Sharon DeBrabander, Justin Adamson, Joanne Gutcher, Racquel Arnae Bobb Miles, Darlene Shelton, Faith Renee Stoneking, Nova Radke, Hathal K. Taie, Cynthia Conner, Jennifer Morman, Elena Shaw, Daniel C. Oliver, Jesseca Lyn Tsosie, Joel Palinsky, E.K., Patricia Smith, D.J.H., M.R., Slade Victor Tully, Mary Jane Vandegrift, Eddie Jo Palinsky, Kathleen Snyder, Fabersha Flynt Lewis, Gwendolyn Morin-Marentes, Kathryn Head, Theresa Davis, Stephanie C. Sander, Crista Munns, Marc Stearns, Donna Jean Heath, Victoria Landeck, Cassandra Bailey, Gloria L. Magana, Andy Pool, Zoraima Lopez, S.C., Elizabeth Lynn Islas, Daniel Dudek, Marsha Novak, Brenda Chand, Christina Melendez, Jessica Heinlein, Donna Engeman, Steven J. Friedrich, Michael Smith, James Vaughn, Ariana Starcevich, Daniel J. Evans, Andrew Lukow, Donna Kuglics, Mark Umbrell, Lucas William Robinson, Justin Waldeck, Eric Levi, Nathan Newby, Sabrina Glawson, Rebecca J. Oliver, Richelle Hecker, T.H., Linda Falter, Kaiya Collado, Kimberly Vesey, Russel Hicks, Sr., Jodee Johnson, Angelica Field, Tyler Nicholas Ogden, S.J.S., C.S., T.T.B., William Lee, Dennis DeBrabander, Evan Kirby, Amanda Vacho, Eric Billiter, John Richard Tully, II, Steve Wadleigh, Marian Brown, Nashima Williams Craig, Patricia Montgomery, Jody Lyn Heinlein, Luke Stiggins, Delilah Brown, Anthony Alderete, Charles E. Matheny, III, Sarah Crosby, Samantha Balsley, Devon Wallace, Joyce Craig, Michael Murphy-Sweet, Kyle Austin Marshall, Kousay Al-Taie, Michael Koulchar, Kurtiss Lamb, Helen Marguerite Irwin, Victoria M. Foley, Alexandria L. Lee, David Garrigus, A.D.B., Elizabeth Chism, Daniel Tyler Brooks, Logan McCoy, Charlotte Freeman, Samantha Tucker, Lillie Lai Lee, Harry Cromity, Tyler Ginavan, Chad Wells, Nichole Sweeney, Angela M. Laird, Joseph T. MIller, Christopher Michael Melendez, Breanna Lynn Gasper, Thomas Kuhlmeier, Alicia Pearson, Judith Tiffner, Carlos Contreras, Nicholas Gene Koulchar, Aloysius Sanchez, Jr., Matthew Coe, Chastity Dawn Laflin, Karen Funcheon, Joyce Brooks, Deborah Smith, Shannon Millican, Sangsoon Kim, Carl K. Greer, Shawn Ryan, Preston Shane Reece, Matthew Whiteside, Arne Eastlund, Mary Niquette, Connie Haddock, Nancy Fuentes, Corena Martin, Austin Wallace, Robert F. Mariano, Dannyel Contreras, Dove Deanna Adams, Audelia Morin, Jacob Michael Robinson, Jerry A. Palinsky, Sr., Marjorie Falter, C.B., L.S., Tifany Thompson, Ling P. Lee, Estavan Morin, Sr., Jennifer Roose, Rachel M. Gillette, Stefanie Wallace, Ursula Ann Joshua, Ronald William Crabtree, Justin Evans, Alisha Huckfeldt, Devon Fletcher Hickman, Anita Baker, Alicia Lammers, Natalia White, Willette Murphy, Susan Arnold, Travis Gibson, Kristen Kelley, Debra Levi, Robert J. Kuhlmeier, Michael R. Mills, Marlynn Gonzales, Danny Arizola, Vickie Michay White, J.H., Jose Reynoso, Amenia Jonaus, Gloria Nesbitt, Gregory Bauer, Luis Rosa-Valentin, David Wayne Hartley, Christina Smith, Andrew Tomson, Matthew L. Mergele, Yolanda Brooks, Mark Hurst, Susan Maria Doskocil Hicks, William Hinson, Frank Lilley, Leanne Lizabeth Hochstetler, Denise Jackson, Judy Collado, Julie Salhus, Kandi Danielle Whiteside, Nicholas Morris, J.M., Ronald Sloan, Austin Bewley, Flora Hood, Raven Adams, Denise Vennix, Candice Machella, Derek Gajdos, Alexander Zayas, Lark Adams, Kelly Gillis, Judy Ann Crabtree, Kiana Blohm, T.R., Timothy Tiffner, Michael J. Miller, Candace Cathryn Hudson, Steven Richards, Matthew Huckfeldt, Carl Reiher, Katie Woodard, Micheal Paul Allen Shelswell, Anastasia Fuller, A.M.H., Carol Kruger, Lorenzo Sandoval, Jr., Emily Shaw, Jodi Michelle Hobson, Rhonda Smith, Harry Riley Bock, Colin Haines, Steven T. Fisher, Brooke Kenney, Bryan S. Shelton, M.R.M., Imo Aieti, Raymond Nigel Spencer, Sr., Michael Scott DeWilde, Christopher Anthony Bershefsky, Lea-Ann Wadleigh, Shilyn Jackson, Sarah Phillips, Kathryn Huckfeldt, Tanja Kuhlmeier, Esteban Morin, Terrell Gilmore, Jr., Jazmon Reyna, Belinda Garcia, Nawal Al-Taie, Christopher Watts, Scott Lilley, Luis Garza, Jason Whitehorse, A.F., M.A.H., Shane Irwin, Robert Kugler, Boonchob Prudhome, Billy Wallace, Donielle Edwards, Jeffrey Adamson, Christopher Whiteside, Brian T. Shelton, Emma McGarry, Preston Charles Kaplan, Marvin Thornsberry, Steven Morris, Chris Farley, Daniel Price, Tammy Kinney, Daniel Benavidez, Sally Chand, Colin Roberts, Scott Huckfeldt, Elizabeth Masterson, Tawanna Talbert Darring, Marlen Pickett, Matthew Adamson, Michael Cook, Daniel R. Benson, Maria Vidal, Vanessa Chism, Russell J. Falter, Rosa Esther Sandoval, Philip Alan Derise, L.W., Randi Jean Martz, Jasmin Reynoso, Rebecca Barattieri, Crystal Stewart, Trenton Starcevich, Stephanie Mcculley and John Richard Tully
Defendant: Fransabank SAL, Bank of Beirut SAL, Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL, Bank Audi SAL, Jammal Trust Bank SAL, Banque Libano-Francaise SAL, BLOM Bank SAL, Middle East Africa Bank SAL, Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Fenicia Bank and John Does 1-50
Amicus Curiae: European Banking Federation
Interested Party: Achraf Safieddine
Case Number: 1:2019cv00007
Filed: January 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 MINUTE ENTRY: A pre-motion conference was held on October 26, 2020 on Defendant Jamaal Trust Bank and Dr. Muhammad Baasiri's anticipated motion to substitute or intervene, and to dismiss. For Plaintiffs: Gary Osen, Esq. For Defendant Jamaal Trust Bank and Dr. Muhammad Baasiri: Elizabeth Foley, Esq. and David Rivkin, Esq. The motion is due November 17, 2020. Plaintiffs' opposition is due December 8, 2020. The reply, if any, is due December 15, 2020. Oral Argument on the motion will be held via telephone on January 12, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Counsel for Dr. Muhammad Baasiri and Defendant Jammal Trust Bank, and counsel for Plaintiffs are directed to call the toll free number 888-398-2342, no later than 1:50 p.m. on January 12, 2021, and enter the access code 1840743, followed by the pound key. These proceedings will be recorded by a court reporter. The attorneys are reminded that they are not to independently record any court proceedings, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8. (Court Reporter Victoria Butler.) (Marks, Aaron)
October 20, 2020 Filing 161 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Carol Bagley Amon providing new authority in support of Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss by Robert Bartlett (Attachments: #1 Henkin et al v. Kuveyt Turk Katilim Bankasi A.S., No. 19-cv-05394 (BMC )) (Osen, Gary)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #160 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian Howard Polovoy terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/1/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
September 30, 2020 Filing 160 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bank of Beirut SAL. (Polovoy, Brian)
September 29, 2020 Filing 159 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Carol Bagley Amon in response to Defendants' September 25, 2020 letter by Robert Bartlett (Osen, Gary)
September 25, 2020 Filing 158 Letter to Judge Carol Bagley Amon from Mark G. Hanchet in Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Dated September 17, 2020 by BLOM Bank SAL, Bank Audi SAL, Bank of Beirut SAL, Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Banque Libano-Francaise SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Fenicia Bank, Fransabank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL, Middle East Africa Bank SAL, Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL (Hanchet, Mark)
September 17, 2020 Filing 157 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Carol Bagley Amon providing new authority in support of Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss by Robert Bartlett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Osen, Gary)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #155 Request for Pre-Motion Conference. A pre-motion conference on Dr. Muhammad Baasiri's and Defendant Jammal Trust Bank's anticipated motions for substitution, to intervene, and to dismiss will be held via telephone on October 26, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Counsel for Dr. Muhammad Baasiri and Defendant Jammal Trust Bank, and counsel for Plaintiffs are directed to call the toll free number 888-398-2342, no later than 1:50 p.m. on October 26, 2020, and enter the access code 1840743, followed by the pound key. These proceedings will be recorded by a court reporter. The attorneys are reminded that they are not to independently record any court proceedings, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on September 9, 2020. (Marks, Aaron)
September 8, 2020 Filing 156 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Carol Bagley Amon in response to the September 1, 2020 letter by Jammal Trust Bank SAL requesting a Pre-Motion Conference by Robert Bartlett (Osen, Gary)
September 1, 2020 Filing 155 Letter re: Pre-Motion Conference by Jammal Trust Bank SAL (Rivkin, David)
September 1, 2020 Minute Entry: Oral argument was held on defendants' motions to dismiss before Judge Carol Bagley Amon on August 31, 2020. Appearances: For plaintiffs: Gary Osen, Ari Ungar, and Michael Radine. For defendant Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL: Michael Sullivan. For defendants Fransabank SAL and BLOM Bank SAL: Linda C. Goldstein and Michael H. McGinley. For defendants Middle East Africa Bank SAL and Fenicia Bank: Mitchell R. Berger and Gassan Baloul. For defendants Byblos Bank SAL, Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, and Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL: Jonathan D. Siegfried. For defendant Bank Audi SAL: Andrew Pincus. For defendant Bank of Beirut SAL: Brian H. Polovoy. For defendant Banque Libano-Francaise SAL: Mark G. Hanchet. For defendant Jammal Trust Bank: Mark W. DeLaquil. The Court reserved decision on the motions. Defendants' motions to dismiss are submitted, and the Court reserves judgment on the motions. (Court Reporter Georgette Betts.) (Marks, Aaron)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Non-party Achraf Safieddine's Motion for Pre-Motion Conference #152 is stayed, on consent of Plaintiffs and non-party Achraf Safieddine, pending the resolution of Defendants' motions to dismiss #134 #136 #139 . Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/31/2020. (Marks, Aaron)
August 28, 2020 Filing 154 Letter from Mark G. Hanchet to Hon. Carol Bagley Amon dated August 28, 2020 re: Oral Argument by Banque Libano-Francaise SAL (Hanchet, Mark)
August 26, 2020 Filing 153 RESPONSE to Motion re #152 MOTION for pre motion conference re #105 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Osen, Gary)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Given the number of parties and counsel involved in this case, counsel for plaintiffs and defendants are directed to file a joint letter on the docket by August 28, 2020 identifying which counsel will be appearing and which counsel will be arguing at the oral argument scheduled for August 31, 2020. The Court requests that no more than one attorney be designated to argue for each side for each motion. The same attorney may argue multiple motions. Counsel are directed to dial in to the number provided in the Court's August 7, 2020 Order no later than 1:50 p.m. on August 31, 2020. In the event that counsel are unable to dial in due to the conference call system being overloaded, (1) the Court will convene the oral argument at 2:15 p.m. at the number already provided, (2) only counsel will be permitted to dial in, and (3) the Court will thereafter make the hearing transcript publicly available. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/24/2020. (Marks, Aaron)
August 21, 2020 Filing 152 MOTION for pre motion conference re #105 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , by Achraf Safieddine. (Lin, David)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral argument on Defendants' motions to dismiss #134 #136 #139 will be held via telephone on August 31, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. The parties are directed to call the toll free number 888-398-2342, no later than 1:50 p.m. on August 31, 2020, and enter the access code 1840743, followed by the pound key. These proceedings will be recorded by a court reporter. The attorneys are reminded that they are not to independently record any court proceedings, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/7/2020. (Cohn, Caroline)
July 29, 2020 Filing 151 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Carol Bagley Amon in response to the Moving Defendants' July 23, 2020 letter by Robert Bartlett (Osen, Gary)
July 23, 2020 Filing 150 Letter on behalf of the Moving Defendants regarding supplemental authority in support of pending motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint by Byblos Bank SAL (Attachments: #1 Atchley v. AstraZeneca UK Ltd., No. CV 17-2136 (RJL), 2020 WL 4040345 (D.D.C. July 17, 2020)) (Siegfried, Jonathan)
March 5, 2020 Filing 149 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Carol Bagley Amon in response to Defendants' March 3, 2020 letter by Robert Bartlett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Osen, Gary)
March 3, 2020 Filing 148 Letter to Judge Carol Bagley Amon from Mark G. Hanchet in Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Dated February 27, 2020 by Banque Libano-Francaise SAL (Hanchet, Mark)
March 2, 2020 Filing 147 Letter to Judge Carol Bagley Amon in Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Dated February 27, 2020 by Jammal Trust Bank SAL (Rivkin, David)
February 27, 2020 Filing 146 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Carol Bagley Amon providing new authority in support of Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss by Robert Bartlett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Osen, Gary)
February 20, 2020 Motion #80 terminated, as per #88 . (Phillips, Alice)
February 3, 2020 Filing 145 Letter re: courtesy copies of the Brief of Amici Curiae the European Banking Federation and the Institute of International Bankers in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint #141 by European Banking Federation, Institute of International Bankers (Fleming, Benjamin)
February 3, 2020 Filing 144 Letter re Courtesy Copies of Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Banque Libano-Francaise SAL (Hanchet, Mark)
February 3, 2020 Filing 143 Letter re: Courtesy Copies of Defedant Jammal Trust Bank SAL's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and Supporting Documents by Jammal Trust Bank SAL (Wangsgard, Kendall)
February 3, 2020 Filing 142 RESPONSE in Opposition re #134 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Jammal Trust Bank Sal's Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, #136 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant SGBL's Notice of Renewed Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, #139 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Schlanger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Osen, Gary)
February 3, 2020 Filing 141 MEMORANDUM in Support re #140 Reply in Support, #139 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Brief of Amici Curiae the European Banking Federation and the Institute of International Bankers in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by European Banking Federation, Institute of International Bankers. (Fried, Lisa)
January 31, 2020 Filing 140 REPLY in Support re #139 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by BLOM Bank SAL, Bank Audi SAL, Bank of Beirut SAL, Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Banque Libano-Francaise SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Fenicia Bank, Fransabank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL, Middle East Africa Bank SAL, Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL. (Hanchet, Mark)
January 31, 2020 Filing 139 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by BLOM Bank SAL, Bank Audi SAL, Bank of Beirut SAL, Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Banque Libano-Francaise SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Fenicia Bank, Fransabank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL, Middle East Africa Bank SAL, Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL. (Attachments: #1 Joint Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Hanchet, Mark)
January 31, 2020 Filing 138 Letter to Judge Amon re Courtesy Copies by Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL (Sullivan, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Filing 137 REPLY in Support re #136 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant SGBL's Notice of Renewed Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Sullivan, #2 Exhibit A) (Sullivan, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Filing 136 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant SGBL's Notice of Renewed Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Michael J. Sullivan, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (Sullivan, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Filing 135 REPLY in Support re #134 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Jammal Trust Bank Sal's Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Jammal Trust Bank SAL. (Rivkin, David)
January 31, 2020 Filing 134 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendant Jammal Trust Bank Sal's Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Jammal Trust Bank SAL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Jammal Trust Bank Sal's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint) (Erb, Nicole)
January 23, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Price Foley on behalf of Jammal Trust Bank SAL (notification declined or already on case) (Foley, Elizabeth)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #132 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/23/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
January 22, 2020 Filing 132 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Price Foley on Behalf of Defendant Jammal Trust Bank Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12281943. by Jammal Trust Bank SAL. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit 1- Certificate of Good Standing from the Washington D.C. Court of Appeals, #3 Exhibit 2- Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Florida, #4 Exhibit 3- Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Texas, #5 Proposed Order) (Foley, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2020 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
January 7, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark DeLaquil on behalf of Jammal Trust Bank SAL (notification declined or already on case) (DeLaquil, Mark)
January 7, 2020 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Rivkin, Jr on behalf of Jammal Trust Bank SAL (notification declined or already on case) (Rivkin, David)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #129 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/7/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #128 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/7/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
January 6, 2020 Filing 129 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark W. Delaquil Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12221316. by Jammal Trust Bank SAL. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (DeLaquil, Mark)
January 6, 2020 Filing 128 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David B. Rivkin, Jr. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12220910. by Jammal Trust Bank SAL. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit 1- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Rivkin, David)
January 6, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendall Eugene Wangsgard on behalf of Jammal Trust Bank SAL (aty to be noticed) (Wangsgard, Kendall)
December 16, 2019 Filing 126 Letter Cover Letter re Service of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Robert Bartlett (Schlanger, Aaron)
December 16, 2019 Filing 125 Letter Cover letter re: Service of Brief of Amici Curiae by European Banking Federation, Institute of International Bankers (Fleming, Benjamin)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order The request in letter #123 for leave to file a brief as amici curiae is GRANTED, unopposed by the parties. No pre-motion conference will be necessary. The proposed amici shall serve their brief on the parties and file the brief via ECF. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/13/2019. (Phillips, Alice)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #124 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gerard Filitti terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 12/12/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
December 11, 2019 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY
December 11, 2019 Filing 124 Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Attorney Gerard Filitti by Robert Bartlett. (Osen, Gary)
December 2, 2019 Filing 123 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference concerning their contemplated motion seeking leave to file a brief as amici curiae in support of the Moving Defendants motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint by European Banking Federation, Institute of International Bankers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Brief of Amici) (Fried, Lisa)
December 2, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Andrew Fleming on behalf of European Banking Federation, Institute of International Bankers (aty to be noticed) (Fleming, Benjamin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Fried on behalf of European Banking Federation, Institute of International Bankers (aty to be noticed) (Fried, Lisa)
November 1, 2019 Filing 120 Letter Cover Letter re Service of Jammal Trust Bank SAL's Motion to Dismiss by Jammal Trust Bank SAL (Erb, Nicole)
November 1, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Reuben J. Sequeira, II on behalf of Jammal Trust Bank SAL (aty to be noticed) (Sequeira, Reuben)
November 1, 2019 Filing 118 Letter Cover Letter re Service of SGBL's Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL (Sullivan, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Filing 117 Letter Cover Letter re Service of Moving Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss by Banque Libano-Francaise SAL (Hanchet, Mark)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #112 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/30/2019. (Oliner, Daniel)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #116 Motion to Adjourn Conference. In light of the District Judge's 9/9/2019 Order, the 10/16/2019 initial conference is adjourned sine die. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/8/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
October 7, 2019 Filing 116 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Letter Motion on Behalf of All Parties to Adjourn the October 16, 2019 Initial Conference by Banque Libano-Francaise SAL. (Hanchet, Mark)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Order granting #115 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The parties' request to adjourn sine die the pre-motion conference previously scheduled for September 11, 2019, is granted. The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule: Defendants shall file their omnibus motion, not to exceed 50 pages, by November 1, 2019; any supplemental motions by individual defendants are due on the same date and shall not exceed 25 pages each. Plaintiffs' opposition, not to exceed 75 pages, is due December 16, 2019. Defendants' omnibus reply, not to exceed 25 pages, is due January 31, 2020; supplemental replies by individual defendants are due on the same date and shall not exceed 15 pages each. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 9/9/2019. (Phillips, Alice)
September 6, 2019 Filing 115 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Letter on behalf of all parties requesting adjournment of the September 11, 2019 pre-motion conference by Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL. (Siegfried, Jonathan)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #114 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/29/2019. (Oliner, Daniel)
August 28, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice John Michel Eubanks Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11800211. by Cassandra Bailey, Walter Bailey, Anita Baker, Samantha Balsley, Afonso Bandhold, Donald C. Bandhold, H. Joseph Bandhold, Henry J. Bandhold, Sr, Mariana Bandhold, Laurel Barattieri, Nicole Barattieri, Rebecca Barattieri, Jamie Barnes, Robert Bartlett, Shawn Bartlett, Terrel Charles Bartlett, Gregory Bauer, Jacob Bauer, Jeremy Bauer, Nicholas Baumhoer, Bryant Bearfield, Rhonda Beattie, Matthew C. Beatty, Deborah Beavers, Daniel Benavidez, Michelle Benavidez, Daniel Benavidez, Jr, Carol Benson, Daniel R. Benson, Daniel P. Benson, Matthew Benson, Melissa Benson, Christopher Anthony Bershefsky, Austin Bewley, Christina Biederman, Eric Billiter, Virginia Billiter, Johnny Allen Blair, Jeremy Blohm, Kiana Blohm, Racquel Arnae Bobb Miles, Paula C. Bobb-Miles, Harry Riley Bock, Jill Ann Bock, Casey Boehmer, Christopher Bogart, Douglas R. Bogart, Evan D. Bogart, Lani D. Bogart, Christopher Bouten, Erin Bouten, Mario Bowen, Ryan Bowman, Andrew Bradley, Ava Lanette Bradley, Constance Brian, Daniel Tyler Brooks, Joshua Brooks, Joyce Brooks, Yolanda Brooks, Andre Brown, Delilah Brown, Marian Brown, Wayne Brown, Nannette Bryne-Haupt, Edna Luz Burgos, Alan Burks, Zachary Burks, Alvis Burns, Holly Burson, C.B., C.F., C.H., C.K., C.L.(a minor), C.S.(a minor), C.W., Jessica Cabot, Maria E. Calle, Brandeaux Campbell, Suheil Campbell, Calvin Canine, James Canine, Robert Canine, David G. Cardinal, Jr, Kari Carosella, Benjamin Daniel Carrington, Britney E. Carter, Daniel Carvill, Mary Carvill, Peggy Carvill-Liguori, Brian J. Casey, Richard Casey, Shelley Ann Casey, Frances Catherine Castro, Brenda Chand, Michael Chand, Jr, Ryan Chand, Sally Chand, Sabrina Chapman, Sheryl Ann Chen, Danny Chism, Elizabeth Chism, Julie Chism, Vanessa Chism, Joaqina Saenz Chorens, Ann Christopher, Jeremy Church, Katrina Coe, Matthew Coe, Brett Coke, Brian Coke, James Cole, Wendy Coleman, Judy Collado, Kaiya Collado, Cassie Collins, Kara Connelly, Kevin Connelly, Cynthia Conner, Carlos Contreras, Cesar Contreras, Dannyel Contreras, Hernan Contreras, Jonathan Contreras, Sr, Noel Contreras, Norma Alicia Contreras, Frank L. Converse, Michael Cook, Valencia Cook, Debra Cook-Russell, Christopher Cote, Francis L. Cote, Nancy Cote, Glenn Michael Cox, Judy Ann Crabtree, Kathy Crabtree, Ronald William Crabtree, Ronald Wayne Crabtree, Aundra Craig, Jonathan Craig, Joyce Craig, Matthew Craig, Nashima Williams Craig, Kathy Crane, Marion Crimens, Marvise L. Crockett, Maxine E. Crockett, Harry Cromity, Sarah Crosby, Katherine M. Crow, Sabrina Cumbe, Colleen Czaplicki, D.A.S., D.D., D.J.F., D.J.H., D.M.W., John Daggett, Todd Daily, Jean Dammann, Mark Dammann, Christopher David, Linda David(individually and on behalf of the Estate of Timothy A. David), Linda David(individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael David), Theresa Davis, Dennis DeBrabander, Nicole DeBrabander, Sharon DeBrabander, Michael Scott DeWilde, Danielle Dechaine-Morris, Cynthia Delgado, Eugene Delozier, Tammy Denboer, Joshua Denman, Philip Alan Derise, Kynesha Dhanoolal, Larry DiCenzo, Nicole DiCenzo, Daniel Dixon, Daniel Austin Dixon, David Dixon, Billy Doal Wells, Melissa Doheny, Leasa Dollar, Eric Donoho, Tammy Dorsey, Susan Maria Doskocil Hicks, Ardith Cecil Dressler, Daniel Dressler, James Dressler, Melissa Dressler, Tanya Suzzette Dressler, Tonya K. Dressler, Kenneth J. Drevnick, Erin Lee Dructor, Andrew Dudek, Daniel Dudek, Margaret Dudek, Sarah Dudek, Lisa Duncan, Samantha Dunford, Dennis Dunn, Sharon Y. Dunn Smith, E.C.R., E.K., E.R., E.W., Arne Eastlund, Elizabeth Jo Eastlund, Sven Eastlund, Taylor Eastlund, Tina Eastlund, Donielle Edwards, Drew Edwards, Timothy W. Elledge, Ed Elliott, Sean Elliott, Donna Engeman, Nathan English, Tricia English, Elva Espinoza, Luz Maria Estrada-Pulido, Daniel J. Evans, Justin Evans, Stephen W. Evans, Tanya Evrard, Linda Falter, Marjorie Falter, Russell J. Falter, Russell C. Falter, Heather Ann Farkas, Barbara Farley, Brett Farley, Cameron Farley, Chris Farley, Donna Farley, Noel S. Farley, Noel J. Farley, Sr., Chad Farr, Patrick Farr, Silver Farr, William Farrar,Sr., Jackie Farrar-Finken, Angelica Field, Donald Field, Selicia Field, Senovia Field, Matthew Fieser, Alan Finken, David Finken, Emilie Finken, Mark Finken, Peter Finken, Richard Finken, Stephen Finken, Gary Douglas Fishbeck, Ingrid Fisher, Misti Fisher, Steven T. Fisher, Cheyenne Flagg, Dixie Flagg, Melinda Flick, Emanuela Florexil, Fabersha Flynt Lewis, Nathaniel Foley, Victoria M. Foley, Lynn Forehand, Helen Fraser, Richard Fraser, Charlotte Freeman, Kathaleen Freeman, Randolph Freeman, Tonya Freeman, Steven J. Friedrich, Fred Frigo, Daniel Fritz, Ethan Fritz, Noala Fritz, Armando Fuentes, Julio Fuentes, Nancy Fuentes, Tatyana Fuentes, Anastasia Fuller, Karen Funcheon, Robert Funcheon, G.B.(a minor), G.F., G.H., G.L., Derek Gajdos, Kristen Galen, Robi Ann Galindo, Angela M. Garcia, Belinda Garcia, David Garrigus, Deadra Garrigus, Matthew Garrigus, Nichole Garrigus, Luis Garza, Breanna Lynn Gasper, Randall Geiger, Anthony M. Gerber, John Gibson, Linda Gibson, Travis Gibson, Rachel M. Gillette, Kelly Gillis, Kacey Gilmore, Terrell Gilmore, Jr., Tyler Ginavan, Curtis Glawson, Sr, Hyunjung Glawson, Kierra Glawson, Sabrina Glawson, James Gmachowski, Christopher Golembe, Ana M. Gomez, Angel Gomez, Maria Gomez, Anona Gonelli, Marlynn Gonzales, Tony Gonzalez, Kathleen Gramkowski, Kevin Graves, Steven Greenwood, Carl K. Greer, Christopher D. Greer, John Dana Greer, Joseph L. Greer, Charles B. Gregston, Ashley Gudridge Houppert, Joanne Gutcher, Rene Gutel, Olga Lydia Gutierrez, H.K., H.S., Amber Habsieger, Brenda Habsieger, Michael Habsieger, Connie Haddock, Colin Haines, David W. Haines, Dawn Haines, Mackenzie Haines, Jill Hake, Kelli D. Hake, Keri Hake, Peter Hake, Skylar Hake, Zachary Hake, Abigail Hall, Andrew Hall, Athena Hall, Karen Hall, Kiersten Hall, Mackenzie G. Hall, Mark A. Hall, Jaydean Hamilton, Sandra Hankins, Arifah Hardy, Lavonna Harper, Sean Harrington, Melba Anne F. Harris, Paul D. Harris, Theresa Hart, David Hartley, David Wayne Hartley, Kaylie Hartley, Joanne Sue Hassler, Richard E. Hassler, Tamara Hassler, Lance Haupt, Rhonda Haupt, Marilyn Haybeck, Kathryn Head, Donna Jean Heath, John David Heath, John D Hecker, Nancy Hecker, Richelle Hecker, Victoria Hecker, William F. Hecker, Jr, Richard Hedgecock, II, Charles Heinlein, Sr, Jessica Heinlein, Jody Lyn Heinlein, Joseph Helton, Sr., Joan Henscheid, Amber Hensley, Karaleen Herb, Joel Hernandez, Victoria Hernandez, Jonathan Heslop, Cana Hickman, David Eugene Hickman, Devon Fletcher Hickman, Veronica Hickman, David James Hicks, Glenn Dale Hicks, Sr, John Christopher Hicks, Russel Hicks, Jr., Russel Hicks, Sr., James Higgins, Steven W. Hiller, Brent Hinson, Fran Hinson, William Hinson, Jackie Merk Hlastan, Brittani Hobson, Heath Damon Hobson, Jodi Michelle Hobson, James David Hochstetler, Leanne Lizabeth Hochstetler, Judy Hoffman, Brittany Hogan, Kathleen Hoke, Sherri C. Holiman, Derek Allen Hollcroft, Jessalyn Holt, Flora Hood, Scott Hood, Stephanie Hood, Jessica Hubbard, Alisha Huckfeldt, Kathryn Huckfeldt, Matthew Huckfeldt, Scott Huckfeldt, Anthony Hudson, Candace Cathryn Hudson, Judy Huenink, Cedric Hunt, Jennifer Lynn Hunt, Robert James Hunt, Rayanne Hunter, Christopher Hurst, Lillian Hurst, Mark Hurst, Max W. Hurst, Tara Hutchinson, I.F., I.W., Rachelle Idol, Helen Marguerite Irwin, Nicole Irwin, Shane Irwin, Elizabeth Lynn Islas, David C. Iverson, J.F., J.H.(a minor), J.J., J.J.H., J.K., J.L.(a minor), J.M., J.M.H., J.R., J.S.S., J.T., J.T.B., Angeline Jackson, Denise Jackson, Kaytrina Jackson, Shilyn Jackson, Billy Johnson, Jodee Johnson, Sharon Johnston, Amenia Jonaus, Claire Jonaus, Gernessoit Jonaus, Marckendy Jonaus, Ricky Jonaus, Daphnie Jonaus Martin, Sharen Jonaus Martin, Janet Jones, Linda Jones, Ursula Ann Joshua, Anne P. Joyner, Christopher Joyner, Bridget Juneau, Stephanie Juneau, K.A., K.A.C, K.A.C.(a minor), K.B., K.E.C, K.K, K.L., K.M., K.M.G., K.R.G., David Kaplan, Nicole A. Kaplan, Noni Kaplan, Preston Charles Kaplan, Kristen Kelley, Rhonda Kemper, Brooke Kenney, Daniel Kenney, Adrianne Kidd, Stephanie Kidder, Michelle Kim, Sangsoon Kim, Seop Kim, Tammy Kinney, James Kinsey, Evan Kirby, John Kirby, Marcia Kirby, Steven Kirby, Greg Klecker, Michelle Klemensberg, Randall Klingensmith, Michael Koulchar, Nicholas Gene Koulchar, Carol Kruger, Douglas Kruger, Lawrence Kruger, Kathy Kugler, Robert Kugler, Les Kuglicis, Donna Kuglics, Edward Kuhlmeier, John Kuhlmeier, Robert J. Kuhlmeier, Robert W. Kuhlmeier, Tanja Kuhlmeier, Theresa A. Kuhlmeier, Theresa Ann Kuhlmeier, Thomas Kuhlmeier, L.M., L.R., L.R.-W., L.S.(a minor), L.W., Chastity Dawn Laflin, Angela M. Laird, Dan Laird, Hunter L. Laird, Jordan M. Laird, Kurtiss Lamb, John D. Lamie, Alicia Lammers, Barbara Lammers, Gary Lammers, Matthew Lammers, Richard Landeck, Victoria Landeck, Nicole Landon, Roady Landtiser, Gretchen Lang, Tyler Latham, Suzzettee Lawson, Alexandria L. Lee, Kenny Lee, Lillie Lai Lee, Ling P. Lee, Richard Lee, Tom B. Lee, William Lee, William J. Lee, Ashley Vacho Leslie, Theodore Lester, Christopher Levi, Debra Levi, Emily Levi, Eric Levi, Donna Lewis, Frank Lilley, Jolene Lilley, Matthew Lilley, Scott Lilley, Jennifer Link, Brenda Little, Tiffany M. Little, William Ronald Little, Nichole Lohrig, Zoraima Lopez, Veronica Lopez Reyes, Andrew Lucas, David Lucas, Michael Lucas, Tim Lucas, Daniel Luckett, Andrew Lukow, Bruce Lukow, Joseph Lukow, Michael Lukow, Rikki Lukow, M.A.H., M.B.S., M.C., M.D.H., M.J.H., M.N., M.R.(a minor), M.R.M, M.R.M., M.T.W., M.W., Joseph T. MIller, Candice Machella, Sylvia Macias, Gloria L. Magana, Christina Mahon, Andrew Charles Major, Ashley Meikel Major, Jeffrey C. Mann, Latasha Marble, Bobbie D. Mariano, Debra Mariano, Jean Mariano, Robert F. Mariano, Donnie Marion, Pam Marion, Kyle Austin Marshall, Corena Martin, Dwight Martin, Margarito A. Martinez, Jr, Ismael Martir, Randi Jean Martz, Russell Mason, Elizabeth Masterson, Charles E. Matheny, III, Adam Mattis, Megan Mauk, Angel Mayes, Donald Mayes, Lori Ann McCormick, Logan McCoy, Lori Ann McCoy, T
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #110 and #111 motions for pre-motion conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on Wednesday, September 11, 2019, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/26/2019. (Phillips, Alice)
August 19, 2019 Filing 113 RESPONSE to Motion re #111 MOTION for pre motion conference , #110 Joint MOTION for pre motion conference on behalf of all Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Osen, Gary)
August 19, 2019 Filing 112 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Joint letter motion on behalf of Plaintiffs and Defendant Fenicia Bank regarding extension of time to respond to Amended Complaint by Fenicia Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Stipulation and Proposed Order) (Baloul, Gassan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 111 MOTION for pre motion conference by Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL. (Sullivan, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 110 Joint MOTION for pre motion conference on behalf of all Defendants by Banque Libano-Francaise SAL. (Hanchet, Mark)
August 7, 2019 Filing 109 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, re: International Service Abroad of (1) Copy of Summons as to Fenicia Bank and Amended Complaint to be served upon Abdul Razzak Achour, Fenicia Bank, Beirut Central District, Foch Street, Fenicia Bank Bldg, Beirut 1103-2110, Lebanon shipped via Fed-Ex International Priority - Tracking #7889 3165 8183, thru the Clerk's Office on 8/6/19 at the request of Attorney Aaron Schlanger. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 8/6/19 re: International Service) (Fernandez, Erica)
August 7, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Rand Berger on behalf of Fenicia Bank (aty to be noticed) (Berger, Mitchell)
August 7, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Gassan Adnan Baloul on behalf of Fenicia Bank (aty to be noticed) (Baloul, Gassan)
August 5, 2019 Filing 106 Summons Issued as to Fenicia Bank. (Fernandez, Erica)
August 2, 2019 Filing 105 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marjorie Falter, Belinda Garcia, Marilyn Haybeck, Flora Hood, Kathaleen Freeman, Theresa A. Kuhlmeier, Daniel Dixon, R.M.S., Charles E. Matheny, III, Rikki Lukow, Tammy Denboer, Elizabeth Lynn Islas, Russel Hicks, Sr., James David Hochstetler, Richard Adamson, Maria Vidal, J.F., Trenton Starcevich, David Hartley, Mark Dammann, Heather Ann Farkas, Kathleen Gramkowski, Jesse Williamson, Jill Ann Bock, Alisha Huckfeldt, Tony Wood, Brian Radke, James Gmachowski, Glenn Michael Cox, Lorenzo Sandoval, Sr, Tyler Ginavan, Marian Brown, A.T., M.D.H., Patricia Arsiaga, Raven Adams, Steven Morris, Matthew Coe, Walter Bailey, Shawn Ryan, Anona Gonelli, James L. Reeves, Veronica Hickman, Jill Hake, Sylvia Macias, David Woodward, Angel Gomez, David Lucas, Nova Radke, Preston Charles Kaplan, Jackie Stewart, Russell Mason, Jessica Heinlein, Barbara Lammers, Sally Chand, Logan McCoy, Nathan Richards, Randolph Delbert Nantz, Nancy Fuentes, Kari Carosella, Deborah Noble, L.S.(a minor), Katherine Prowse, Dan Laird, Summer Stephens, Linda David(individually and on behalf of the Estate of Timothy A. David), C.H., Maria E. Calle, Yolanda Brooks, Nicole DeBrabander, John Watts, Marcia Kirby, Angel Munoz, William F. Hecker, Jr, Daisy Tucker, Sarah Phillips, Carol Kruger, Robert Bartlett, John Kirby, D.M.W., Kyshia Sutton, Alvis Burns, Patrick Tutwiler, Danielle Sweet, Kevin Connelly, Racquel Arnae Bobb Miles, S.C., Amy Lynn Robinson, Lisa Duncan, Luis Junior Puertas, John Christopher Hicks, Kaylie Hartley, T.B., Francis L. Cote, Kathleen Stephens, Danny Arizola, William Hinson, Christopher Anthony Bershefsky, Albert Snyder, Terrell Gilmore, Jr., Ryan Chand, Alexandria L. Lee, Kara Connelly, Daniel Dudek, Adrian Mccann, Margaret Dudek, Linda Pritchett, Anthony M. Gerber, Lidia Sullivan, Katherine McRill-Fellini, Devon Fletcher Hickman, Amanda B. Adair, Sangsoon Kim, Ingrid Fisher, Bayli Vacho, Allen Swinton, Kiana Blohm, Iliana M. Rosa-Valentin, Virginia Billiter, S.W.(a minor), W. Jean Reeves, Austin Bewley, Jazmon Reyna, Gretchen Lang, Christopher Hurst, Joanne Gutcher, Danielle Dechaine-Morris, Patrick Farr, Harry Cromity, W.H.(a minor), Daphnie Jonaus Martin, Emily Shaw, Patrick O'Neill, Rachelle Idol, Andrew Dudek, Nicole B. Stein, Steven Price, Adrianne Kidd, Andrew Jeffrey Anderson, Daniel Luckett, Denise Jackson, Jason Whitehorse, Russel York, Elizabeth Murphy-Sweet, J.S.S., D.J.F., Richard Neiberger, Tim Lucas, Steven W. Hiller, Daniel Tyler Brooks, Scott Huckfeldt, William Allmon, J.H.(a minor), Charles Vincent, Helen Marguerite Irwin, Julie Salhus, Daniel Austin Dixon, Steven Richards, Leanne Lizabeth Hochstetler, Tonya K. Dressler, Paul D. Harris, Erin Lee Dructor, Tricia English, Ed Elliott, Rhonda Smith, Kenneth J. Drevnick, Evan Kirby, Noel J. Farley, Sr., Michael Chand, Jr, William Justin Weatherly, Jody Lyn Heinlein, Kristen Kelley, Tracie Arsiaga, Chaquita Talbert, Eric Donoho, Fran Hinson, Carl Reiher, Rachel M. Gillette, Douglas R. Bogart, Ashley Wells Simpson, Jonathan Heslop, Masina Tuliau, Glenda Starcevich, Rhonda Beattie, A.D.B., Joshua Ryan Nantz, Ronald William Crabtree, Silver Farr, Sabrina Cumbe, Johnny Allen Blair, Paula C. Bobb-Miles, D.J.H., Kristin Walker, Nashima Williams Craig, R.N.S., Peter Hake, Kyle Austin Marshall, Nicole DiCenzo, Kacey Gilmore, M.W., Todd Daily, R.M.(a minor), Steven Vernier, Jr, David Noble, Brett Coke, Brittany Hogan, Maria Gomez, C.K., Richard Landeck, H.S., Marckendy Jonaus, Floyd Burton Robinson, Curtis Glawson, Sr, James Cole, Ricardo Arizola, Derek Gajdos, Mark Schichtl, Rosa Esther Sandoval, Rhett Stephens, Robert James Hunt, Brenda Habsieger, Alicia Lammers, Wendy Coleman, Candace Cathryn Hudson, Kynesha Dhanoolal, Linda David(individually and on behalf of the Estate of Michael David), Meghan Parker-Crockett, Patrick Reuben, Robert J. Kuhlmeier, Chad Wells, Dennis DeBrabander, Lance Haupt, K.A.C. (a minor), Charles Heinlein, Sr, Debra Mariano, Jason York, Necole Dunlow Smith, Willette Murphy, Narciso Melendez, Tyler Latham, David Eugene Hickman, Debra Levi, Noni Kaplan, Emma McGarry, Katie Woodard, Crystal Stewart, Lillie Lai Lee, Michele White, Clifford L. Smith, Jr, Lisi Aieti, Luke Stiggins, Mary Catherine McLaughlin, Gernessoit Jonaus, Daniel R. Benson, D.D., Ardith Cecil Dressler, Kousay Al-Taie, William Lee, Jeanette West, Brian J. Casey, Matthew Adamson, Megan Marie Sabatino, Delilah Brown, Christina Mahon, Zachary Burks, Marsha Novak, Misti Fisher, Bree Reuben, L.M., Rhonda Haupt, Luis Rosa-Valentin, Jasmin Reynoso, Gwendolyn Morin-Marentes, Theresa Ann Kuhlmeier, Michael Mock, Daniel Thomas, Jr, Julio Fuentes, Erin Bouten, David Garrigus, T.T.B., Kristen Galen, J.J.H., Katherine M. Crow, Casey Boehmer, James Higgins, Emily Adams, Karen Hall, Raymond Montgomery, Terrymarie Stanton, Sherri C. Holiman, Stephanie Gibson Webster, Jamie Zarcone, Joshua Starkey, K.E.C, John Taylor, Carrol Alderete, Tracy Anderson, J.J., R.J.S., Lori Ann McCormick, Tina Eastlund, Nanette Saenz, Barbara Farley, Jackie Merk Hlastan, Kathryn Huckfeldt, Randolph Freeman, Maxine E. Crockett, Cameron Farley, Juan Saenz, Thomas Smith, Jennifer Renee York, Boonchob Prudhome, Stephanie Mcculley, Drew Edwards, Rhonda Kemper, Daniel C. Oliver, Cecilia Arizola, Jacob Michael Robinson, Michelle Taylor, T.M.(a minor), Derek Stephens, Bruce Lukow, Kathy Kugler, Stephanie Hood, M.R.(a minor), Tonya Freeman, Michelle Benavidez, Edward Kuhlmeier, Justin Adamson, Nichole Lohrig, Anthony Alderete, Nawal Al-Taie, William Witte, Anne P. Joyner, Clifford Vaughn, A.F.(a minor), Lauren Shumate, Tawanna Talbert Darring, Daniel Benavidez, Skylar Hake, Michael Lukow, Charlee Blair Webb, Henry J. Bandhold, Sr, Jeffrey D. Price, Marc Stearns, Brandon Arnold, Adam Wood, Christopher Levi, I.W., Nicholas Gene Koulchar, Wayne Brown, C.S.(a minor), B.B., Greg Klecker, Glenn Dale Hicks, Sr, Robert Funcheon, Nancy Umbrell, Colleen Czaplicki, Joaqina Saenz Chorens, Daniel Carvill, Aloysius Sanchez, Sr, Ava Tomson, Nathaniel Foley, Donna Jean Heath, Audelia Morin, Katrina Coe, G.H., Philip Alan Derise, Marlynn Gonzales, Joshua Denman, Cory Smith, Angela M. Laird, Megan Wood, L.W., Matthew Craig, Judy Ann Crabtree, Andrew Lukow, Darlene Shelton, Wesley Williamson, Luke Murphy, Raymond Nigel Spencer, Sr., Deadra Garrigus, Kathryn Head, Denise Vennix, K.A.C, Larry DiCenzo, Joyce Craig, Cesar Contreras, Emily Levi, Joedi Wood, Joseph Lukow, Cana Hickman, Robin Roberts, Sarah Dudek, S.S., Sean Elliott, Georgianna Stephens-Smith, Jordan M. Laird, Christopher Bouten, Patrick Ward, Melissa Dressler, Tatyana Fuentes, Tanja Kuhlmeier, Eric Phye, Gloria P Reynoso, Joan Henscheid, Nicholas Morris, Steven J. Friedrich, G.L., Matthew Menke, Robert Kugler, Terrel Charles Bartlett, Cathy Andino, Adam Mattis, Phyllis Taylor, J.M.H., Amber Habsieger, Ariana Starcevich, K.A., Heath Damon Hobson, S.L.H., Brent Hinson, Timothy Tiffner, E.R., Kimberlee Austin-Oliver, Mark Hurst, Lisa Ramaci, Kelly Gillis, Norma Alicia Contreras, M.B.S., J.L.(a minor), Joseph T. MIller, Jeremy D. Smith, Donald Mayes, Alan Burks, Megan People, John Richard Tully, II, Brett Farley, Christopher Joyner, Angelica Andrade, Matthew Garrigus, Steven T. Fisher, Jennifer Roose, Cassandra Bailey, Eric Neiberger, Sharen Jonaus Martin, Trent Stephens, Lee Wolfer, Nicholas Prowse, Theresa Davis, Kaiya Collado, Tabitha McCoy, Justin Waldeck, Joni Ariel Reeves Little, Tammy Dorsey, Jodee Johnson, Roberto Arizola, Sr, Nathan English, Alison Burks McRuiz, Cynthia Delgado, Andrew Bradley, Kedrick Dante Moody, Don Jason Stone, Donna Lewis, Andy Pool, Jerry L. Myers, Jeffrey C. Mann, George Arsiaga, John Stearns, Bridget Juneau, Breanna Lynn Gasper, Donna Farley, Austin Wallace, Brian T. Shelton, Afonso Bandhold, Mary Neiberger, Nancy Hecker, Kira Sikes, Richard Tomson, Mackenzie Haines, Christopher Bogart, Luz Maria Estrada-Pulido, Jessica H. Williams, Nicholas Baumhoer, Sandra Hankins, Esteban Morin, Michael Koulchar, Gina Tesnar, Lindsay Young, Rebecca J. Oliver, Charles B. Gregston, James Smith, Jackie Farrar-Finken, Sabrina Glawson, Michael Scott DeWilde, Shannon Shumate, John D Hecker, Lillian Hurst, David Wayne Hartley, Ryan Wilson, Lola Jean Modjeska, Beverley Wolfer, Denice York, Fabersha Flynt Lewis, Keri Hake, Pamela Adle-Watts, Robi Ann Galindo, Brandie Stanton, Kurtiss Lamb, Bryan S. Shelton, M.R.M, Johnny Javier Miles, Jr, Jacqueline A. Smith, Melissa Benson, Mark Munns, Carl K. Greer, Carrie Thompson, Tom B. Lee, Richard Fraser, Joanne Sue Hassler, Andrew Lucas, Hunter L. Laird, Jonathan Contreras, Sr, Maria Alvarez, Alexander Zayas, Nannette Bryne-Haupt, Connie Haddock, Jennifer Link, Dove Deanna Adams, Charlotte Freeman, Holly Burson, Christopher Watts, Natalia White, Zachary Hake, T.S. (a minor), Sean Harrington, Tamara Runzel, Shyanne Smith-Lizotte, K.B., Suzzettee Lawson, Cedric Hunt, E.C.R., Gladys E. Reyes Centeno, Lavonna Harper, Dawn Haines, Robert Neiberger, Jennifer Morman, Harry Riley Bock, Carlos Contreras, Devon Wallace, Tiffany M. Little, Mary Jane Vandegrift(individually and on behalf of the Estate of Matthew R. Vandegrift), Samantha Dunford, Christina Melendez, Calvin Canine, Les Kuglicis, Wayne Newby, Rebecca Barattieri, Kyla Ostenson, Frances Catherine Castro, Judy Hoffman, Brenda Little, Paula Menke, Connie Moody, Debra Wigbels, Jean Dammann, Donna Engeman, Stephanie Kidder, Sylvia Johnson Spencer, Deborah Smith, Debra Cook-Russell, Michael Habsieger, H. Joseph Bandhold, I.F., Megan Mauk, Estavan Morin, Sr, J.T.B., Rayanne Hunter, Daniel Benavidez, Jr, Hernan Contreras, Taylor Eastlund, Christina Smith, Micheal Paul Allen Shelswell, J.M., Judy Collado, Dixie Flagg, Chastity Dawn Laflin, Ashley Vacho Leslie, Ricky Jonaus, M.R.M., Tanya Evrard, Colin Haines, Lucas William Robinson, John Richard Tully, Mark Umbrell, P.A., Jean Pruitt, Veronica Pena Andrade, Richard Lee, Carol Benson, Roberto Aaron Arizola, Timothy Newman, Colin Roberts, Roberto Andrade, Sr., Sven Eastlund, Sabrina Chapman, Shane Irwin, Scott Lilley, Crystal Tutwiler, Suheil Campbell, Douglas Kruger, David Finken, Mariana Bandhold, Petra Spialek, Velina Sanchez, Daniel Tho
July 25, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Elsner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Elsner, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 9, 2019, before Judge Carol B. Amon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda D Danelczyk, Telephone number 718-613-2330. Email address: Linda_Danelczyk@nyed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 8/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2019. (Danelczyk, Linda)
July 15, 2019 Filing 102 Letter Cover Letter re. Service of Defendant MEAB's Motion to Dismiss by Middle East Africa Bank SAL (Baloul, Gassan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 101 Letter to Counsel pursuant to Judge Amon's Individual Rule 3(D) regarding service of Supplemental Motion To Dismiss by Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL (Sullivan, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 100 Letter Cover Letter re Service of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss by Banque Libano-Francaise SAL (Hanchet, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #99 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Counsel are advised that the Initial Conference currently scheduled for 7/17/2019 has been rescheduled to 10/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/12/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 12, 2019 Filing 99 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Letter motion on behalf of all defendants requesting the adjournment of the July 17, 2019 Initial Conference by Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL. (Siegfried, Jonathan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Franklin George Monsour, Jr on behalf of Middle East Africa Bank SAL (aty to be noticed) (Monsour, Franklin) Modified on 7/11/2019 to correct the spelling of attorney name (Piper, Francine).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #97 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William Adam Friedman terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/8/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 5, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William A. Friedman) (Friedman, William)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the parties' joint proposed briefing schedule, D.E. # 91 at 3, the premotion conference currently scheduled for June 21, 2019 is adjourned sine die. Defendants shall file their omnibus motion, not to exceed 50 pages, by July 15, 2019. MEAB and SGBL shall file their supplemental motions, not to exceed 25 pages each, on the same date. Plaintiff shall file a joint response, not to exceed 75 pages, by August 19, 2019. Defendants shall file their omnibus reply, not to exceed 25 pages, by September 20, 2019. MEAB and SGBL shall file their individual replies, not to exceed 15 pages, on the same date. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 6/12/2019. (Bannon, Zachary)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting [91-93] Motions for Pre-Motion Conference. A Pre-Motion Conference will be held on June 21, 2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 10D South. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 6/11/2019. (Bannon, Zachary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 96 Letter from Gary M. Osen to Hon. Carol Bagley Amon regarding Defendants' May 31, 2019 Pre-Motion Conference Letters, ECF Nos. 91-93 by Robert Bartlett (Osen, Gary)
June 6, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Clyde T. Turner on behalf of Robert Bartlett (aty to be noticed) (Turner, Clyde)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #90 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/6/2019. (Oliner, Daniel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE by Robert Bartlett re #90 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11532177. Supplemented COG (Turner, Clyde)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #90 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel shall supplement the filing at #90 to provide, pursuant to Local Rule 1.3(c): "a certificate of the court for each of the states in which the applicant is a member of the bar... and [which] states that the applicant is a member in good standing of the bar of that state court...." (emphasis added). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/5/2019. (Oliner, Daniel)
May 31, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION for pre motion conference by Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL. (Sullivan, Michael)
May 31, 2019 Filing 92 Letter by Middle East Africa Bank SAL (Baloul, Gassan)
May 31, 2019 Filing 91 Joint MOTION for pre motion conference on behalf of all Defendants by Banque Libano-Francaise SAL. (Hanchet, Mark)
May 31, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11532177. by A.B.(a minor). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Good Standing) (Turner, Clyde)
May 9, 2019 Filing 89 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Banque Libano-Francaise SAL (Hanchet, Mark)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: As such, the Court strikes the allegations in Paragraphs 348 and 352 of the Complaint without prejudice to Plaintiffs' amending the Complaint to allege additional facts that would establish the relevance of the Safieddine allegations to the issues in this case. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 5/9/2019. (Fernandez, Erica)
May 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon: For Plaintiffs - Gary Osen, Ari Unger; For Proposed Intervenor Achraf Safieddine - David Lin. Oral Argument held on Proposed Intervenor Safieddine's motion to strike, D.E. # 80. Safieddine's motion to strike is granted, order to follow. (Court Reporter Linda Danelczyk.) (Bannon, Zachary)
May 2, 2019 PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE: re #85 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian J. Leske Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11434308. $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11444588 (Leske, Brian)
May 2, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Leske on behalf of Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL (notification declined or already on case) (Leske, Brian)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #86 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/1/2019. (Oliner, Daniel)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #85 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/1/2019. (Oliner, Daniel)
April 30, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11435454. by BLOM Bank SAL, Fransabank SAL. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael H. McGinley In Support, #2 Proposed Order) (McGinley, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian J. Leske Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11434308. by Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian J. Leske, #2 Exhibit A - MA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit C - VA Certificate of Good Standing) (Leske, Brian)
April 19, 2019 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jammal Trust Bank SAL identifying Corporate Parent Hanover International Holding Limited for Jammal Trust Bank SAL. (Curran, Christopher)
April 18, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Stewart Alonzo on behalf of Middle East Africa Bank SAL (aty to be noticed) (Alonzo, Joseph)
April 15, 2019 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #80 Fully Briefed MOTION to Intervene Fully Briefed MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, filed by Robert Bartlett. (Osen, Gary)
April 15, 2019 Filing 81 REPLY in Support re #80 Fully Briefed MOTION to Intervene Fully Briefed MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, filed by Achraf Safieddine. (Lin, David)
April 15, 2019 Filing 80 Fully Briefed MOTION to Intervene , Fully Briefed MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, by Achraf Safieddine. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Achraf Safieddine in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Safieddine Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Safieddine Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Safieddine Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Safieddine Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Safieddine Decl., #7 Memorandum in Support) (Lin, David)
April 12, 2019 Filing 79 Notice of Related Case (Davis, Kimberly)
April 8, 2019 Filing 78 Letter regarding Mr. Safieddine's Motion for Limited Intervention and Motion to Strike by Robert Bartlett (Osen, Gary)
March 25, 2019 Filing 77 Letter re: Motion to Intervene/Strike by Achraf Safieddine (Lin, David)
March 14, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Pincus on behalf of Bank Audi SAL (notification declined or already on case) (Pincus, Andrew)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #74 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/14/2019. (McCuiston, Hannah)
March 13, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Charles Kelly on behalf of Bank Audi SAL (aty to be noticed) (Kelly, Kevin)
March 12, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew J. Pincus Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11279644. by Bank Audi SAL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew J. Pincus in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Pincus, Andrew)
March 11, 2019 Minute Entry for Pre-Motion Conference: For Plaintiff - Gary M. Osen; For Proposed Intervenor Safieddine - David D. Lin. Safieddine's motion to intervene/strike is due March 25, 2019. Plaintiffs' response is due April 8, 2019. Any reply is due April 15, 2019. The parties are directed to appear for oral argument on May 9, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10D South before the Honorable Carol Bagley Amon. (Court Reporter Holly Driscoll.) (Bannon, Zachary)
March 7, 2019 PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE: re #60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael J. Sullivan Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11216375. $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11264927 (Sullivan, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sullivan on behalf of Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL (notification declined or already on case) (Sullivan, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #60 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, as supplemented at #69 . The attorney shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. The supplemental submission at #69 was incorrectly filed as a Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. See 2/27/2019 Order deferring ruling on motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Accordingly, that motion is terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/5/2019. (Tuffaha, Omar)
March 4, 2019 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fransabank SAL (Goldstein, Linda)
March 4, 2019 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLOM Bank SAL (Goldstein, Linda)
March 4, 2019 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 Letter MOTION to Intervene on a limited basis for leave to fileLetter MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, paragraphs 348 and 352 filed by Robert Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Osen, Gary)
March 1, 2019 Filing 69 Supplemental MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael J. Sullivan Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11216375. by Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael J. Sullivan, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Sullivan, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL (Mateyaschuk, Douglas)
March 1, 2019 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL (Mateyaschuk, Douglas)
March 1, 2019 Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Byblos Bank SAL (Mateyaschuk, Douglas)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 7/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The Parties should be prepared to discuss discovery and any settlement possibilities. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/27/2019. (Tuffaha, Omar)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion at #46 is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 5/31/2019. The Parties may stipulate to any earlier schedule, but given the length of the Complaint, the fact-intensive investigation required to respond to the Complaint and the complex legal issues raised by the Complaint, the Court will not require Defendants to respond by the proposed earlier dates. Any pre-motion conference letter must include a complete proposed briefing schedule in accordance with Rule 3.B of Judge Amon's Individual Motion Practices and Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/27/2019. (Tuffaha, Omar)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #60 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Per Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), a motion for leave to appear pro hac vice must include a properly sworn and notarized affidavit, with the locus of notarization below the case caption, containing the information specified by the Local Rule. The affidavit attached to counsel's motion at #60 does not satisfy this requirement. Counsel is ordered to supplement his motion by filing a properly sworn and notarized affidavit in accordance with the Local Rules. The affidavit should not be filed as a new motion. It will be considered as a supplement to the existing motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/27/2019. (Tuffaha, Omar)
February 27, 2019 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank Audi SAL (Houpt, Christopher)
February 27, 2019 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Middle East Africa Bank SAL (Baloul, Gassan)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING MOTION: The parties' joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Accepting Service and Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, D.E. # 46, is respectfully referred to the Honorable Vera M. Scanlon. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 2/25/2019. (Bannon, Zachary)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, D.E. # 60, is respectfully referred to the Honorable Vera M. Scanlon. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 2/25/2019. (Bannon, Zachary)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: On February 14, 2019, Proposed Intervenor Achraf Safieddine filed a Letter Motion to Intervene, D.E. # 47, not in accordance with this Court's Individual Motion Practices and Rules. The Court construes this motion as a letter for a pre-motion conference. Plaintiffs are directed to respond to this letter by March 4, 2019. A pre-motion conference will be held March 11, 2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 10D South before the Honorable Carol Bagley Amon. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 2/25/2019. (Bannon, Zachary)
February 22, 2019 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL (Sullivan, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Rand Berger on behalf of Middle East Africa Bank SAL (aty to be noticed) (Berger, Mitchell)
February 22, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Gassan Adnan Baloul on behalf of Middle East Africa Bank SAL (aty to be noticed) (Baloul, Gassan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael J. Sullivan Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11216375. by Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael J. Sullivan, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Sullivan, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Naomi B Weinberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Weinberg, Naomi)
February 15, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Delelle on behalf of Jammal Trust Bank SAL (aty to be noticed) (Delelle, Claire)
February 15, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Erb on behalf of Jammal Trust Bank SAL (aty to be noticed) (Erb, Nicole)
February 15, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Mark Curran on behalf of Jammal Trust Bank SAL (aty to be noticed) (Curran, Christopher)
February 15, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Hamburg on behalf of Banque Libano-Francaise SAL (aty to be noticed) (Hamburg, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G. Hanchet on behalf of Banque Libano-Francaise SAL (aty to be noticed) (Hanchet, Mark)
February 14, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Houpt on behalf of Bank Audi SAL (aty to be noticed) (Houpt, Christopher)
February 14, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda C. Goldstein on behalf of BLOM Bank SAL, Fransabank SAL (aty to be noticed) (Goldstein, Linda)
February 14, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Walter Mateyaschuk, II on behalf of Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL (aty to be noticed) (Mateyaschuk, Douglas)
February 14, 2019 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of Beirut SAL (Polovoy, Brian)
February 14, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Sabath Weisburg on behalf of Bank of Beirut SAL (aty to be noticed) (Weisburg, Henry)
February 14, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Howard Polovoy on behalf of Bank of Beirut SAL (aty to be noticed) (Polovoy, Brian)
February 14, 2019 Filing 47 Letter MOTION to Intervene on a limited basis for leave to file, Letter MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, paragraphs 348 and 352 by Achraf Safieddine. (Lin, David)
February 12, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Accepting Service and Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL. (Siegfried, Jonathan)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer on consent of the parties. The parties are directed to file a stipulation and proposed order concerning service of process and the time within which Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by February 14, 2019. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 2/4/2019. (Bannon, Zachary)
February 4, 2019 Filing 45 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint letter motion on behalf of all parties regarding interim extension of time by Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL. (Siegfried, Jonathan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Siegfried on behalf of Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL (aty to be noticed) (Siegfried, Jonathan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jacob Radine on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Radine, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Bartlett. BLOM Bank SAL served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 16, 2019 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Bartlett. Jammal Trust Bank SAL served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 16, 2019 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Bartlett. Banque Libano-Francaise SAL served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 16, 2019 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Bartlett. Bank Audi SAL served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 16, 2019 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Bartlett. Byblos Bank SAL served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 16, 2019 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Bartlett. Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 16, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Bartlett. Middle East Africa Bank SAL served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 16, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Bartlett. Bank of Beirut SAL served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Bartlett. Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Bartlett. Fransabank SAL served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Bartlett. Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 14, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Judge Nina Gershon no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
January 14, 2019 Filing 31 R.N.S., Tonya Freeman, Jerry L. Myers, Jeffrey D. Price, Cassie Collins, Deborah Smith, James Smith, Cory Smith, Christina Smith, Joseph Helton, Sr., Jessica Cabot, Jeanne Rhea Mcmanus, Victor Ray Wise II, Theodore Lester, Katrina Coe, K.A.C, K.A.C., Rhonda Smith, Matthew Coe, Sabrina Chapman, Nicholas Baumhoer, James Kinsey, Angel Mayes, Luke Stiggins, Donald Mayes, Rhonda Beattie, Jaydean Hamilton, Stephanie Kidder, George D. White, Natalia White, Kristin White, George J. White, Edna Luz Burgos, John Mcculley, Stephanie Mcculley, T.M., R.M., Donald Field, Angelica Field, Senovia Field, Selicia Field, Theresa Hart, Wayne Newby, Nathan Newby, Ed Elliott, Veronica Hickman, David Eugene Hickman and Devon Fletcher Hickman added. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2) (Osen, Gary)
January 14, 2019 Filing 30 Jamie Barnes, Max W. Hurst, Lillian Hurst, Christopher Hurst, Mark Hurst, Donna Farley, Noel J. Farley, Sr., Barbara Farley, Brett Farley, Cameron Farley, Chris Farley, Vickie Mchone, Noel S. Farley, David C. Iverson, Daniel Menke, Paula Menke, Matthew Menke, Nichole Lohrig, Jessica H. Williams, J.M.H., J.J.H., J.H., Rosemarie Alfonso, K.B., Tyler Latham, Michelle Benavidez, Daniel Benavidez, Christina Biederman, Daniel Benavidez, Jr, Jennifer Morman, Christopher Miller, Bryant Bearfield, Angeline Jackson, Kaytrina Jackson, Shilyn Jackson, Tony Gonzalez, Marlynn Gonzales, Tamara Runzel, Megan People, Shaula Shaffer, Carllie Paul, Kari Carosella, Gregory Bauer, Connie Haddock, Jacob Bauer, Jeremy Bauer, Andrew Bradley, Julie Salhus, Kristen Galen, Patrick Ward, Jarrett Ward, Roberto Andrade, Sr., Veronica Pena Andrade, Sandra Valencia, Angelica Andrade, Veronica Denisse Andrade, Kara Connelly, Jean Dammann, Mark Dammann, Kevin Connelly, Theresa Davis, Rhonda Kemper, Robert Canine, S.C., Janet Jones, Calvin Canine, James Canine, Jennifer Roose, Rhett Murphy, Roady Landtiser, Nathan Richards, Steven Richards, Christopher Songer, Kimberly Songer, C.S., Linda David, Linda David, Christopher David, Kenneth J. Drevnick and Megan Marie Sabatino added. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2) (Osen, Gary)
January 14, 2019 Filing 29 James Vaughn, Jeannine Vaughn, Clifford Vaughn, David Hartley, David Wayne Hartley, Kaylie Hartley, Lisa Duncan, Virginia Billiter, Eric Billiter, Adrianne Kidd, Allen Swinton, Temika Swinton, T.S., T.S., T.B., Linda Pritchett, William Allmon, Ronald Sloan, Mary Jane Vandegrift, Mary Jane Vandegrift, Mark E. Thomsen, Ardell Thomsen, Ralph Thomsen, Evan D. Bogart, Lani D. Bogart, Douglas R. Bogart, Christopher Bogart, Cana Hickman, Luis Rosa-Valentin, M.R., Iliana M. Rosa-Valentin, Pam Marion, Donnie Marion, Adrian Mccann, Don Jason Stone, Preston Charles Kaplan, Nicole A. Kaplan, Noni Kaplan, David Kaplan, Jamie Zarcone, Jessalyn Holt, David Woodward, D.M.W., Adam magers, Luis Garza, Susan Arnold, David Arnold, Samantha Tucker, Brandon Arnold, Daisy Tucker, John Daggett, Colleen Czaplicki, Russel Hicks, Sr., Russel Hicks, Jr., Wesley Williamson, Jesse Williamson, Patrick O'Neill, John O'Neill, Dianne O'Neill, Daniel Luckett and Breanna Lynn Gasper added. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2) (Osen, Gary)
January 14, 2019 Filing 28 Terrell Gilmore, Jr., Kynesha Dhanoolal, Jason Robinson, Frances Robinson, E.R., William Justin Weatherly, Michael Weatherly, Merlese Pickett, Harry Cromity, Marlen Pickett, Kemely Pickett, Vivian Pickett, Kyshia Sutton, Rachel M. Gillette, Rebekah Scott, Lee Wolfer, L.W., M.W., I.W., Beverley Wolfer, Patricia Smith, Michael Smith, Jacqueline A. Smith, Thomas Smith and Rachelle Idol added. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2) (Osen, Gary)
January 14, 2019 Filing 27 Kathy Kugler, Robert Kugler, Tanya Evrard, Billy Johnson, Judy Hoffman, Ashley Gudridge Houppert, Joshua Schichtl, Mark Schichtl, Katherine Prowse, Nicholas Prowse, H.S., S.S., C.S., A.S., Steve Wadleigh, Lea-Ann Wadleigh, Michael Lukow, Rikki Lukow, Bruce Lukow, Joseph Lukow, Andrew Lukow, Kristen Kelley, Maria Alvarez, K.A., Angela Alvarez, Belinda Garcia, Jason Whitehorse, Jeffrey C. Mann, Michelle West, Rebecca L. Samten-Finch, D.A.S., M.B.S., Ava Lanette Bradley, A.D.B., T.T.B., J.T.B., Anthony Hudson, Austin Bewley, Christopher Levi, Eric Levi, Debra Levi, Emily Levi, Kimberly Vesey, Marion Crimens, Timothy W. Elledge, Mary Catherine McLaughlin, Brenda Habsieger, Michael Habsieger, Amber Habsieger, Kelli D. Hake, G.H., Denice York, Russel York, Peter Hake, Jill Hake, Zachary Hake, Keri Hake, Skylar Hake, Jennifer Renee York, Jason York, Maria E. Calle, Cynthia Delgado, Tabitha McCoy, Logan McCoy, R.M., Matthew Fieser, Benjamin Daniel Carrington, Jonathan Heslop, Russell Mason, Andy Pool, Frank L. Converse, Anthony M. Gerber, Charles B. Gregston, Kimberly Miller, Michael J. Miller, Carl Reiher, Walter Bailey, Cassandra Bailey and Kacey Gilmore added. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2) (Osen, Gary)
January 14, 2019 Filing 26 K.A.C., Candace Cathryn Hudson, K.E.C, Amanda B. Adair, Patrick Tutwiler, Crystal Tutwiler, Shirley Stearns, John Stearns, Karen Hall, Marilyn Haybeck, Marc Stearns, James Cole, John D. Lamie, Donna Lewis, J.L., J.L., G.L., Jean Mariano, Katherine McRill-Fellini, Brett Coke, Brian Coke, Matthew L. Mergele, Rene Pool, Derek Allen Hollcroft, Paula C. Bobb-Miles, Johnny Javier Miles, Sr, Johnny Javier Miles, Jr, Racquel Arnae Bobb Miles, Ursula Ann Joshua, Tammy Kinney, Daniel Price, Steven Price, Tausolo Aieti, Imo Aieti, Lisi Aieti, Poloka Aieti, Christopher Bouten, Erin Bouten, Daniel Dudek, Margaret Dudek, Katie Woodard, Sarah Dudek, Emanuela Florexil, Andrew Dudek, Joseph T. MIller, Sean Harrington, Jessica Heinlein, Charles Heinlein, Sr, Jody Lyn Heinlein, Margarita Aristizabal, J.J., Sebastian Niuman, Richard Neiberger, Mary Neiberger, Ami Neiberger, Robert Neiberger, Eric Neiberger, Brian J. Casey, Brittany Hogan, Shelley Ann Casey, Richard Casey, Sally Chand, Michael Chand, Jr, Christina Mahon, Ryan Chand, Mario Bowen, Brenda Chand, James David Hochstetler, Leanne Lizabeth Hochstetler, J.H., P.H., Kyle Austin Marshall, John Richard Tully, Marilyn Louise Tully, Slade Victor Tully, John Richard Tully, II, Heather Ann Farkas, Robert James Hunt, M.A.H., A.M.H., Boonchob Prudhome, Michele White, S.W., Shelby White, Perry White, Robert White, Joshua P.G. Wold, E.W., P.A., Celeste Yantis, Maricel Murray, J.M., Bryan S. Shelton, Darlene Shelton, Brian T. Shelton, Dan Laird, Angela M. Laird, Jordan M. Laird, Hunter L. Laird, C.L., Leslie K. Reeves-Hardcastle, J.R., James L. Reeves, W. Jean Reeves, Sherri C. Holiman, Joni Ariel Reeves Little, William Lee, Alexandria L. Lee, William J. Lee, Lillie Lai Lee, Jennifer Lynn Hunt, Christopher Golembe, Kathryn Head, Christopher Watts, Janet L. Rios, Anita Baker, Jennie L. Morin, Randall Geiger, Jesseca Lyn Tsosie, Eric Donoho, Tyler Ginavan, Timothy Tiffner, Judith Tiffner, Joshua TIffner, Seth Tiffner, Sarah Crosby, Alan Burks, Jackie Merk Hlastan, G.B., Alison Burks McRuiz, Sarah Phillips, Zachary Burks, Bridget Juneau, Stephanie Juneau, Tammy Vanderwaal, A.L.R., Preston Shane Reece, Shaylyn C. Reece, C.S., L.S., Emily Shaw, Melissa Doheny and Elena Shaw added. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2) (Osen, Gary)
January 11, 2019 Filing 25 Shyanne Smith-Lizotte, Erin Lee Dructor, Trent Stephens, Kathleen Stephens, Derek Stephens, Rhett Stephens, Summer Stephens, Brittani Hobson, Cynthia Conner, William Farrar,Sr., Joshua Brooks, Joyce Brooks, Daniel Tyler Brooks, Delilah Brown, Tonya K. Dressler, Ardith Cecil Dressler, Melissa Dressler, Tanya Suzzette Dressler, Daniel Dressler, James Dressler, Elizabeth Masterson, Marian Brown, Wayne Brown, Danielle Sweet, A.B., G.B., Donna Kuglics, Les Kuglicis, Emily Adams, Derek Gajdos, Tammy Denboer, Brandeaux Campbell, Ryan Wilson, Jami Lin Wilson, Matthew Lammers, Alicia Lammers, Barbara Lammers, Gary Lammers, Stacy Pate, Angel Gomez, Denise Jackson, Scott Hood, Flora Hood, Dixie Flagg, Stephanie Hood, Cheyenne Flagg, William Parker, Meghan Parker-Crockett, Andrew Moores, Sheila Tracy, Donald Tracy, Nichole Sweeney, Christina Sheridan, Matthew Benson, Melissa Benson, C.B., B.B., Daniel P. Benson, Carol Benson, Daniel R. Benson, Raymond Nigel Spencer, Sr., Sylvia Johnson Spencer, Michael Dean Moody, Connie Moody, Kedrick Dante Moody, Drew Edwards, Donielle Edwards, Arifah Hardy, T.C., Aundra Craig, Joyce Craig, Debra Cook-Russell, Nashima Williams Craig, Matthew Craig, Jonathan Craig, Andre Brown, Michael Cook, Valencia Cook and Katherine M. Crow added. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2) (Osen, Gary)
January 11, 2019 Filing 24 Peter Finken, Lori Ann McCoy, L.M., T.M., Glenn Michael Cox, Sangsoon Kim, Seop Kim, Michelle Kim, Kurtiss Lamb, Francis L. Cote, Nancy Cote, Christopher Cote, Samantha Dunford, Maximillian Shroyer, Casey Reuben, Bree Reuben, Patrick Reuben, Jackie Stewart, Mark Munns, Crista Munns, Sharon DeBrabander, Dennis DeBrabander, Nicole DeBrabander, Joella Pratt, Helen Fraser, Richard Fraser, Tricia English, Nathan English, N.C.E., A.S.E., Todd Daily, Joshua Starkey, Brent Hinson, William Hinson, Fran Hinson, Hilary Westerberg, Linda Gibson, John Gibson, Stephanie Gibson Webster, Sean Elliott, Travis Gibson, William Ronald Little, Brenda Little, Kira Sikes, Joshua Denman, Randolph Delbert Nantz, Joshua Ryan Nantz, Lori Ann McCormick, Deborah Beavers, Denise Vennix, Jeremy Blohm, Kiana Blohm, James Smith, Megan Mauk, Robert Vaccaro, Joanne Gutcher, Charlotte Freeman, G.F., I.F., Kathleen Snyder, Randolph Freeman, Kathaleen Freeman, Albert Snyder, Richard Lee, Danny Chism, Elizabeth Chism, Vanessa Chism, Julie Chism, Russell J. Falter, Linda Falter, Marjorie Falter, Russell C. Falter, John Sackett, Jason Sackett, Michael Lucas, Marsha Novak, David Lucas, Tim Lucas, Andrew Lucas, Shannon Millican, Paul Mitchell Millican, Noala Fritz, Daniel Fritz, Ethan Fritz, Billy Wallace, Stefanie Wallace, Austin Wallace, Devon Wallace, C.W., Evan Kirby, Marcia Kirby, Steven Kirby, Johnny Washburn, Marvin Thornsberry, Cynthia Thornsberry, A.B., Tracy Anderson, Jeffrey Anderson, Adam G. Stout, Andrew Jeffrey Anderson, Elizabeth Lynn Islas, Anastasia Fuller, A.F., Samantha Balsley, L.R.-W., Heath Damon Hobson, Jodi Michelle Hobson, M.D.H., Deadra Garrigus, David Garrigus, Nichole Garrigus, Kyla Ostenson, Matthew Garrigus, Shawn Ryan, Sharon Y. Dunn Smith, Dennis Dunn, Richard Landeck, Victoria Landeck, Lavonna Harper, Melba Anne F. Harris, Paul D. Harris, Hyunjung Glawson, Yolanda Brooks, Curtis Glawson, Sr, Kierra Glawson, Sabrina Glawson, Jazmon Reyna, Ryan Sabinish, R.J.S., S.J.S., Carrie Thompson, A.T., Daniel Thomas, Sr, Diana Thomas, Daniel Thomas, Jr, Kelly Gillis, Melinda Flick, Ann Christopher, Nancy Fuentes, Armando Fuentes, Julio Fuentes, Tatyana Fuentes, Emma McGarry, D.J.F., John Kirby, Michael Murphy-Sweet, Elizabeth Murphy-Sweet, Anona Gonelli, Lindsay Young, S.W., Leasa Dollar, Eugene Delozier, Michelle Klemensberg, Scott Lilley, Frank Lilley, Jolene Lilley, Matthew Lilley, Ava Tomson, Richard Tomson, Bradley Starcevich, Glenda Starcevich, Ariana Starcevich, Trenton Starcevich, Samantha Tomson, Andrew Tomson, Jared S. Stevens, Susan Maria Doskocil Hicks, Glenn Dale Hicks, Sr, David James Hicks, John Christopher Hicks, S.L.H., Karen Funcheon, Robert Funcheon, Dwight Martin, Dove Deanna Adams, Raven Adams, Lark Adams, Holly Burson, Nancy Umbrell, Mark Umbrell, Casey Boehmer, Jeremy D. Smith, Daniel Dixon, Jessica Hubbard, M.R., L.R., David Dixon, Daniel Austin Dixon, Gretchen Lang, Rebecca J. Oliver, Daniel C. Oliver, Kimberlee Austin-Oliver, Tiffany M. Little, K.L., Shelley Ann Smith and Dakota Smith-Lizotte added. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2) (Osen, Gary)
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, re: International Service Abroad of (1) Copy of Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet to be served upon Saad Azhari, Blom Bank SAL shipped via Fed-Ex International Priority - Tracking #7741 6158 8578, thru the Clerk's Office on 1/11/19 at the request of Attorney William Adam Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 1/11/19 re: International Service) (Galeano, Sonia)
January 11, 2019 Filing 22 Necole Dunlow Smith, Michael R. Mills, M.R.M., M.R.M, Eddie Jo Palinsky, Jerry A. Palinsky, II, Adina Palinsky, Jerry A. Palinsky, Sr, Kathleen Hoke, Joel Palinsky, Karaleen Herb, Eric Brandon Stoneking, Carrie Sue Stoneking, Faith Renee Stoneking, Nanette Saenz, Juan Saenz, Joaqina Saenz Chorens, Luz Maria Estrada-Pulido, Frances Catherine Castro, Elva Espinoza, Amanda Vacho, Bayli Vacho, John Vacho, Ashley Vacho Leslie, Ronald Veverka, Carol Polley, Keith Veverka, Douglas Veverka, Sandra Soliday, Jeanette West, Shelby West, Donna Engeman, Shannon Shumate, Lauren Shumate, L.S., L.S., Nicole DiCenzo, D.D., Larry DiCenzo, Kathy Crane, Johnny Allen Blair, Charlee Blair Webb, Suzzettee Lawson, C.L., Arne Eastlund, Tina Eastlund, Sven Eastlund, Taylor Eastlund, Elizabeth Jo Eastlund, Matthew Adamson, R.A., Kathy Adamson, Richard Adamson, Christopher Adamson, Jeffrey Adamson, Justin Adamson, James Shepard, John P. Sklaney, III, Kathy Crabtree, M.C., Judy Ann Crabtree, Ronald Wayne Crabtree, Debra Wigbels, Ronald William Crabtree, Judy Huenink, Sean Slaven, Chastity Dawn Laflin, Nicole Landon, Misti Fisher, Steven J. Friedrich, A.F., Philip Alan Derise, Norma Alicia Contreras, Jonathan Contreras, Sr, Carlos Contreras, Cesar Contreras, Hernan Contreras, Noel Contreras, Dannyel Contreras, Sharon M. Pugh, Britney E. Carter, Alicia Pearson, Daniel J. Evans, Justin Evans, Kevin Graves, Nicholas Gene Koulchar, Michael Koulchar, Suheil Campbell, Alexander Zayas, A.Z.-C., Cathy Andino, Luis Junior Puertas, Lidia Sullivan, Gabriela D. Puertas Vergara-Donoso, Christopher Michael Melendez, Narciso Melendez, Christina Melendez, Laurel Barattieri, Patricia Wheatley, Rebecca Barattieri, Nicole Barattieri, Gina Tesnar, Gloria L. Magana, Mario Stanton, Brandie Stanton, Terrymarie Stanton, Fred Frigo, Nannette Bryne-Haupt, Lynn Forehand, Lance Haupt, Rhonda Haupt, Tifany Thompson, Sabrina Cumbe, William Witte, Michael Mock, Tammy Dorsey, Eric Phye, James Gmachowski, Constance Brian, Amber Hensley, David W. Haines, Dawn Haines, Colin Haines, Mackenzie Haines, Karar Alabsawi, Michelle Taylor, J.T., Phyllis Taylor, John Taylor, Brian G. Taylor, Judas Recendez, Tyler Norager, Shalee Norager, M.N., Harry Riley Bock, Jill Ann Bock, Mariah Simoneaux, Kousay Al-Taie, Nawal Al-Taie, Bashar Al-Taie, Hathal K. Taie, Lawrence Kruger, Carol Kruger, C.K., E.K., Douglas Kruger, Jackie Farrar-Finken, Emilie Finken, C.F., J.F., Stephen Finken, Alan Finken, Richard Finken, David Finken, Mark Finken, Jean Pruitt and Joan Henscheid added. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2) (Osen, Gary)
January 10, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, re: International Service Abroad of (1) Copy of Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet to be served upon Anwar A. Jammal, Jammal Trust Bank SAL shipped via Fed-Ex International Priority - Tracking #7741 6190 5296, thru the Clerk's Office on 1/10/19 at the request of Attorney William Adam Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 1/10/19 re: International Service) (Galeano, Sonia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, re: International Service Abroad of (1) Copy of Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet to be served upon Walid Raphael, Banque Libano Francaise SAL shipped via Fed-Ex International Priority - Tracking #7741 6172 8648, thru the Clerk's Office on 1/10/19 at the request of Attorney William Adam Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 1/10/19 re: International Service) (Galeano, Sonia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, re: International Service Abroad of (1) Copy of Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet to be served upon Ghassan T. Assaf, Bank of Beruit & The Arab Countries SAL shipped via Fed-Ex International Priority - Tracking #7741 6179 5325, thru the Clerk's Office on 1/10/19 at the request of Attorney William Adam Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 1/10/19 re: International Service) (Galeano, Sonia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, re: International Service Abroad of (1) Copy of Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet to be served upon Samir N. Hanna and Dr. Imadi Itani, Bank Audi SAL shipped via Fed-Ex International Priority - Tracking #7741 6148 8130, thru the Clerk's Office on 1/10/19 at the request of Attorney William Adam Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 1/10/19 re: International Service) (Galeano, Sonia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, re: International Service Abroad of (1) Copy of Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet to be served upon Semaan Bassil, Byblos Bank SAL shipped via Fed-Ex International Priority - Tracking #7741 6133 5785, thru the Clerk's Office on 1/10/19 at the request of Attorney William Adam Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 1/10/19 re: International Service) (Galeano, Sonia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, re: International Service Abroad of (1) Copy of Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet to be served upon Salim Sfeir, Bank of Beirut SAL shipped via Fed-Ex International Priority - Tracking #7741 6156 8598, thru the Clerk's Office on 1/10/19 at the request of Attorney William Adam Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 1/10/19 re: International Service) (Galeano, Sonia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, re: International Service Abroad of (1) Copy of Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet to be served upon Antoun Sehnaqui, Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban SAL shipped via Fed-Ex International Priority - Tracking #7741 6169 2058, thru the Clerk's Office on 1/10/19 at the request of Attorney William Adam Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 1/10/19 re: International Service) (Galeano, Sonia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, re: International Service Abroad of (1) Copy of Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet to be served upon Adnan Kassar, Fransabank SAL shipped via Fed-Ex International Priority - Tracking #7741 6175 0065, thru the Clerk's Office on 1/10/19 at the request of Attorney William Adam Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 1/10/19 re: International Service) (Galeano, Sonia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, re: International Service Abroad of (1) Copy of Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet to be served upon Abul Hafiz M. Itani, Lebanon & Gulf Bank SAL shipped via Fed-Ex International Priority - Tracking #7741 6165 1460, thru the Clerk's Office on 1/10/19 at the request of Attorney William Adam Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 1/10/19 re: International Service) (Galeano, Sonia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, re: International Service Abroad of (1) Copy of Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet to be served upon Vincent Nabih Haddad, Middle East Africa Bank Sal shipped via Fed-Ex International Priority - Tracking #7741 6183 4657, thru the Clerk's Office on 1/10/19 at the request of Attorney William Adam Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 1/10/19 re: International Service) (Galeano, Sonia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 Kristin Walker, Steven T. Fisher, Kathleen Gramkowski, Mary Carvill, Peggy Carvill-Liguori, Daniel Carvill, Pamela Adle-Watts, John Watts, Gloria Nesbitt, D.J.H., Chaquita Talbert, Tawanna Talbert Darring, Latasha Marble, James Talbert, Miranda Pruitt, Velina Sanchez, Aloysius Sanchez, Sr, Rommel Rocha, Phillip Sanchez, Aloysius Sanchez, Jr, Gloria P Reynoso, Jasmin Reynoso, Patricia Reynoso, Jose Reynoso, Ashley Wells Simpson, Chad Wells, Crystal Stewart, Chasity Wells-George, Candice Machella, Billy Doal Wells, Hope Elizabeth Veverka, Donna Jean Heath, Lola Jean Modjeska, John David Heath, Olga Lydia Gutierrez, Ismael Martir, Victoria M. Foley, Nathaniel Foley, Michael Scott DeWilde, Steven Morris, Danielle Dechaine-Morris, Nicholas Morris, K.M., Monica Arizola, Roberto Aaron Arizola, Roberto Arizola, Sr, Cecilia Arizola, Danny Arizola, Ricardo Arizola, Greg Klecker, Raymond Montgomery, Patricia Montgomery, Tony Wood, Joedi Wood, Adam Wood, Megan Wood, Lisa Ramaci, Isabell Vincent, Charles Vincent, Maria Vidal, Tamara Hassler, Richard E. Hassler, Joanne Sue Hassler, Scott Huckfeldt, Kathryn Huckfeldt, Alisha Huckfeldt, Matthew Huckfeldt, Timothy Newman, Padraic J. Newman, Amenia Jonaus, Gernessoit Jonaus, Daphnie Jonaus Martin, Ricky Jonaus, Marckendy Jonaus, Claire Jonaus, Sharen Jonaus Martin, Masina Tuliau, Gwendolyn Morin-Marentes, Audelia Morin, Esteban Morin, Estavan Morin, Sr, Brianna Renee Navejas, Margarito A. Martinez, Jr, Amy Lynn Robinson, Floyd Burton Robinson, Jacob Michael Robinson, Lucas William Robinson, Alvis Burns, Jodee Johnson, James Higgins, Wendy Coleman, Brian Radke, Nova Radke, Steven Vernier, Jr, Clifford L. Smith, Jr, Georgianna Stephens-Smith, Corena Martin, Adam Mattis, Terrance Peterson, III, Petra Spialek, David G. Cardinal, Jr, Richelle Hecker, Victoria Hecker, W.H., C.H., William F. Hecker, Jr, Nancy Hecker, John D Hecker, Robert F. Mariano, Debra Mariano, Bobbie D. Mariano, Vickie Michay White, Gladys E. Reyes Centeno, Veronica Lopez Reyes, Zoraima Lopez, Jennifer Link, Sharon Johnston, Kenny Lee, Tom B. Lee, Ling P. Lee, Deborah Noble, David Noble, Charles E. Matheny, III, Judy Collado, Kaiya Collado, Justin Waldeck, Tanja Kuhlmeier, Robert J. Kuhlmeier, Theresa A. Kuhlmeier, Theresa Ann Kuhlmeier, Edward Kuhlmeier, Thomas Kuhlmeier, John Kuhlmeier, Robert W. Kuhlmeier, Patrick Farr, Silver Farr, Carrol Alderete, Anthony Alderete, Chad Farr, Rayanne Hunter, W.H., T.H., Fabersha Flynt Lewis, Christopher Anthony Bershefsky, Lorenzo Sandoval, Sr, Lorenzo Sandoval, Jr, Adrian Sandoval, Rosa Esther Sandoval, Henry J. Bandhold, Sr, Afonso Bandhold, Mariana Bandhold, H. Joseph Bandhold, Donald C. Bandhold, Joshua P. Stein, Nicole B. Stein, R.M.S., J.S.S., Jesse P. Stein, Micheal Paul Allen Shelswell, Erik Roberts, E.C.R., Robin Roberts, James Craig Roberts, Cara Roberts, Colin Roberts, Luke Murphy, Willette Murphy, Shane Irwin, T.R., Helen Marguerite Irwin, Nicole Irwin, Maria Gomez, John Dana Greer, Stephanie C. Sander, Christopher D. Greer, Joseph L. Greer, Carl K. Greer, Christopher Joyner, Anne P. Joyner, Brian Montogmery and K.K added. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2) (Osen, Gary)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE - it is now the responsibility of Counsel to add all Parties to their docket sheet. Parties can be added using the event Utility Events - Add Parties (under Other Documents). (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nina Gershon and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard Filitti on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Filitti, Gerard)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dina Gielchinsky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Gielchinsky, Dina)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy T. Schlanger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Schlanger, Cindy)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Ungar on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Ungar, Ari)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M. Osen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Osen, Gary)
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Schlanger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11063587 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Matthew Arsiaga, Tracie Arsiaga, Steven W. Hiller, Terrel Charles Bartlett, Robert Bartlett, Jeremy Church, Steven Greenwood, Robi Ann Galindo, Marvise L. Crockett, Linda Jones, Gilbert Arsiaga, Jr, Angel Munoz, Cedric Hunt, Patricia Arsiaga, Ingrid Fisher, Sylvia Macias, Shawn Bartlett, George Arsiaga, Sandra Hankins, Maxine E. Crockett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2) (Friedman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlett et al v. Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven W. Hiller
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Jones
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvise L. Crockett
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Arsiaga, Jr.
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bartlett
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Clyde T. Turner
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Arsiaga
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Arsiaga
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Arsiaga
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Macias
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Church
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robi Ann Galindo
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine E. Crockett
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Arsiaga
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Bartlett
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Fisher
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Munoz
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrel Charles Bartlett
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Greenwood
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Hankins
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Hunt
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gerard Filitti
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Cindy T. Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: William A. Friedman
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bree Reuben
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cole
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.M.S.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet L. Rios
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Sackett
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Moores
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Javier Miles, Jr.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Reuben
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chasity Wells-George
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anona Gonelli
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Menke
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Price
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dana Greer
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.T.W.
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.H.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mackenzie G. Hall
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Eugene Hickman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Montogmery
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Finken
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Washburn
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gernessoit Jonaus
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Billiter
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.W.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul D. Harris
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.F.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Kirby
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary Westerberg
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Hake
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys E. Reyes Centeno
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Martin
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline A. Smith
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Farley
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisi Aieti
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.B.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria P Reynoso
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.H.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Foley
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.L.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Hoke
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Catherine McLaughlin
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ardell Thomsen
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Charles Major
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Kidder
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.Z.-C.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rommel Rocha
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Klemensberg
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Adams
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Ann Farkas
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Richards
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Mitchell Millican
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis L. Cote
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.K
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Tutwiler
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Starkey
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Swinton
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariah Simoneaux
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia English
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Benavidez
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Scott
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Vanderwaal
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Wells Simpson
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ronald Little
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Taylor
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Frigo
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Duncan
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Sweet
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.S.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Austin Dixon
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Crabtree
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Niquette
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Chand, Jr.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karaleen Herb
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy W. Elledge
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Veverka
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Niquette
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Mariano
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lilley
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Sullivan
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hartley
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mock
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole DeBrabander
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Finken
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Phye
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Brown
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valencia Cook
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Neiberger
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Haines
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan English
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Justin Weatherly
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara Roberts
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph L. Greer
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Hassler
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Walker
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles B. Gregston
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Ann Kuhlmeier
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark E. Thomsen
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velina Sanchez
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Benson
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temika Swinton
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie K. Reeves-Hardcastle
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Alvarez
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Wheatley
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanette Saenz
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Hart
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hubbard
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hedgecock, II
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Field
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharen Jonaus Martin
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Heinlein, Sr.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Craig
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kenney
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.R.-W.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.S.S.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Elliott
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Bradley
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Anderson
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Thornsberry
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shepard
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher David
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Schichtl
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Andrade
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Finken
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Thomas, Sr.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J. Casey
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin White
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgianna Stephens-Smith
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lee
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.R.M
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lucas
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlee Blair Webb
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Huenink
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Dressler
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Brandon Stoneking
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Pate
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.C.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Klingensmith
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Hensley
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Juneau
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Hickman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lucas
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaqina Saenz Chorens
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max W. Hurst
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarito A. Martinez, Jr.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrol Alderete
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Smith
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Habsieger
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne O'Neill
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Joyner
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Starcevich
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine McRill-Fellini
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D.H.
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele White
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen Lang
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gibson
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Mayes
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri C. Holiman
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Starcevich
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Chand
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Juneau
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam G. Stout
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Farley
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hood
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Valencia
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Michael E. Elsner
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: John M. Eubanks
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times