O'Brien et al v. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company et al
Plaintiff: Leonard Pryor, Candi Ellis, Thomas Keister, Gregory Wilkerson, Rebecca Pritchard, Douglas Culver, II, Charles Hayes, Rebecca Montaldo, Tiffany Toler, Carla Montemayor, Delois Gamble, Steven Thompson, Deborah Burney, Brooke Locklear, Daniel Smith, Patricia Leadbeater, Leslie Ecklund, Donna Hultberg, James Kussman, Lynette Carmona, Maria Canas, Gregory Hair, Kathryn Foard-Mandujano, Arthur Bell, Charlene Ake, Bernice Hammonds, Dawn Kussman, Gretchen Allen, Stephanie Yost, Howard Melton, James Harris, Mary Rogers, Pamela Britt, Joshua Otey, William Pritchard, Regina Wheeler, Kenric Melvin, Jenita Compton, Paul Frye, Gene Hester, Jack Smith, Jr., Cynthia Gregory, Kristen Moon, Garna Parsley, Myong Frye, Scott Ellis, Elizabeth Culver, Kenneth Dew, Denise Kirk, Larry Parsley, Robin Ragland, Bernice Thaggard, David Smith, Jr., Charles Jackson, Michael Cox, James Bledsoe, Daniel Ullom, Pany Butler, Lydia Dieck, Robert Wesselman, Gerald Black, Jackie Stewart, Laura O'Brien, Kristy Jackson, Carol Parker, Nellie Warren, Joseph Maitland, Eli Mandujano, Gina Hardy, Janice Canady, Brian Thomas, Nicole Rivers, Sara Ruble, Vonda Floyd, James Daniels, Doris Canady, Mandisa Autry, Carrol Heiner, Chad Barfield, Mark Wonderly, Craig Allen, Steven Dion, Michael Beard, Deborah Raines, Patricia Mitchell, Paul Prchal, Boris Calderon, Jo Healey, Loren Spencer, Rebecca Spencer, Mickey Clevidence, Deborah Holloway, Glenn Lewis, Sr., Donald Healey, Bobby Stewart, Ernest Canady, Patricia Thomas, Phillip Autry, Anne Beahm, Jose Rodriguez, Barbara Webb, Willie Herndon, Gertrude Kirk, Scott Moon, Jody Rosenberg, Craig Wayman, Danny Gregory, Brett Hardy, Theresa Hofstrom, Danny Jackson, Christopher Williams, Deborah Phillips, Louanna Cordova, Gene Phillips, William Holloway, Bernette Thaggard, Roland Wheeler, Sr., Aaron Manuel, Debra Brown, Christopher Dunn, Wanda Evans, Tisher Raye, Gary Mitchell, Matthew Philpot, Grace Hales, Jill Philpot, Susan Wonderly, Malenna Orndorf, Nathan Yost, Keresea Cox, Levetta Melvin, Aaron Rosenberg, Julian Clemenger, Hubert Parker, Jr., Steve Fogleman, Raymond Rogers, Bryan Spencer, Ronald Ragland, Charles Canady, Janis Bledsoe, Jakob Ecklund, Kim Canady, Aaron Compton, Samuel Council, William Brown, Jr., Velda Kester, Heather Callihan, Glen Hofstrom, Ronald Benson, Sherry Manuel, Stephen Hales, Veronica Fulton, David Stephens, Charles Brown, Kimberly Kelley, Loren Beahm, Krista Smith, Warren Dickens, Terrence White, Sam Chapman, James O'Brien, Nedra Jackson, Michael McLamb, Wendy Otey, Ronald Parker, Jr., Christopher Jones, Raymond Toler, Jr., Maurice Jackson, Benjamin Dieck, Patricia Brogdon-Wilcox, Melissa Spencer, Teresa Rodriguez, Elwood Heiner, Michael Ruble, Debbie Beard, Ruth Pugh, William Pugh, Matthew Pierce, Shawna Engler, Wendy Wayman, Paul Kelley, James Council, Candice Odom, Roland Wheeler, Jr., Wanda Calderon, Ronald Hensley, Karabeth Hammonds, Ricky Spencer, Richard Young, Maria Watson, Stephen Raines, Michelle Key, Betty Smith, Vernell Ullom, Kerry Dunn, Karen Price, Brian Jones, Yvonne Wheeler, Ann Hester, Leticia Gilmore, Jordan Prchal, Charlene Jackson, Mary Thaggard, Paul Morris, Theresa Chapman and William Mitchell
Defendant: E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC and DOES 1 to 25
Case Number: 5:2020cv00208
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/17/2020. (Sellers, N.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC. (Erickson, David)
June 16, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company. (Erickson, David)
June 16, 2020 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company identifying Corporate Parent DOWDUPONT, INC. for E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company. (Erickson, David)
June 16, 2020 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Chemours Company (Erickson, David)
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Chemours Company FC, LLC identifying Corporate Parent THE CHEMOURS COMPANY for The Chemours Company FC, LLC. (Erickson, David)
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Kenneth J. Reilly on behalf of E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC. (Reilly, Kenneth)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by David R. Erickson on behalf of E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC. (Erickson, David)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas Hamilton Segars on behalf of E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC. (Segars, Thomas)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Brett D Land on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Land, Brett)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Cary L McDougal on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McDougal, Cary)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by M. Cristina Sanchez on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sanchez, M.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen C Johnston on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Johnston, Stephen)
May 21, 2020 Notice to Counsel - For efficiency and docket clarity, for all future filings by Plaintiffs, please select only one Plaintiff as the filer and then add "et al" in the docket text. (Sellers, N.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by All Plaintiffs (Seagle, J.) Modified on 5/21/2020 - shortened docket text. (Sellers, N.)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by J. Harold Seagle on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Seagle, J.)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 Notice filed by All Plaintiffs SUMMONSES. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Seagle, J.) Modified on 5/21/2020 - shortened docket text. (Sellers, N.)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 Notice filed by All Plaintiffs CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Seagle, J.) Modified on 5/21/2020 - shortened docket text. (Sellers, N.)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, DOES 1 to 25 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5434285.), filed by Boris Calderon, Chad Barfield, Jill Philpot, Vernell Ullom, Kimberly Kelley, Grace Hales, Mary Rogers, Jordan Prchal, Ricky Spencer, Nathan Yost, Charlene Ake, Christopher Dunn, Jo Healey, Carol Parker, Debbie Beard, Denise Kirk, Veronica Fulton, Ronald Ragland, James Kussman, Carrol Heiner, Craig Allen, Loren Spencer, Patricia Leadbeater, Matthew Philpot, Gregory Hair, Leonard Pryor, Steve Fogleman, Debra Brown, Janice Canady, Tisher Raye, Patricia Mitchell, William Pugh, Sara Ruble, Christopher Jones, Charlene Jackson, Janis Bledsoe, Shawna Engler, Betty Smith, Kim Canady, Patricia Thomas, Laura O'Brien, Gene Hester, Charles Hayes, Pamela Britt, Joshua Otey, Doris Canady, Glen Hofstrom, Raymond Rogers, Kathryn Foard-Mandujano, Garna Parsley, Levetta Melvin, William Holloway, Kristy Jackson, Gina Hardy, Michael McLamb, Sherry Manuel, Maria Canas, Ronald Benson, Barbara Webb, Glenn Lewis, Sr, Christopher Williams, Melissa Spencer, Wendy Otey, Vonda Floyd, Carla Montemayor, Elizabeth Culver, Terrence White, Stephen Hales, Heather Callihan, Rebecca Spencer, Nedra Jackson, Hubert Parker, Jr, Brooke Locklear, Steven Dion, Candi Ellis, Bernice Thaggard, Loren Beahm, Richard Young, Lynette Carmona, Susan Wonderly, Jody Rosenberg, Patricia Brogdon-Wilcox, Nellie Warren, Roland Wheeler, Sr, Scott Moon, Ronald Hensley, Mandisa Autry, Robin Ragland, Stephanie Yost, Velda Kester, Michelle Key, David Stephens, Leslie Ecklund, Jack Smith, Jr, Deborah Raines, Theresa Chapman, Daniel Ullom, Lydia Dieck, Aaron Manuel, Dawn Kussman, Candice Odom, Wanda Calderon, Gretchen Allen, Deborah Holloway, Jackie Stewart, Michael Beard, Kristen Moon, Wendy Wayman, Roland Wheeler, Jr, Steven Thompson, Jose Rodriguez, Mary Thaggard, Gertrude Kirk, Eli Mandujano, Howard Melton, Maria Watson, Theresa Hofstrom, Krista Smith, Raymond Toler, Jr, Rebecca Pritchard, Aaron Rosenberg, Bobby Stewart, David Smith, Jr, Brian Thomas, James Harris, Mickey Clevidence, Louanna Cordova, William Pritchard, Rebecca Montaldo, Daniel Smith, Scott Ellis, Gene Phillips, Karen Price, William Mitchell, Deborah Burney, Mark Wonderly, Delois Gamble, Paul Frye, Jenita Compton, Danny Jackson, Stephen Raines, Keresea Cox, Brett Hardy, Bernice Hammonds, Matthew Pierce, Elwood Heiner, Kerry Dunn, Charles Jackson, Warren Dickens, Donald Healey, Paul Kelley, Maurice Jackson, Brian Jones, Gary Mitchell, James O'Brien, Tiffany Toler, Deborah Phillips, Charles Canady, James Council, Julian Clemenger, Charles Brown, Teresa Rodriguez, Anne Beahm, Arthur Bell, Regina Wheeler, James Bledsoe, Ronald Parker, Jr, Michael Cox, Pany Butler, Donna Hultberg, Kenric Melvin, Craig Wayman, Ann Hester, Bernette Thaggard, Leticia Gilmore, Gerald Black, Willie Herndon, Karabeth Hammonds, Yvonne Wheeler, Samuel Council, Benjamin Dieck, Phillip Autry, Cynthia Gregory, Thomas Keister, Jakob Ecklund, Danny Gregory, Michael Ruble, Paul Prchal, Larry Parsley, Gregory Wilkerson, James Daniels, Sam Chapman, Robert Wesselman, Ruth Pugh, Bryan Spencer, Myong Frye, Wanda Evans, Douglas Culver, II, Aaron Compton, Kenneth Dew, Ernest Canady, William Brown, Jr, Joseph Maitland, Paul Morris, Nicole Rivers, Malenna Orndorf. (Seagle, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien et al v. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Pryor
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candi Ellis
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Keister
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Wilkerson
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Pritchard
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Culver, II
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hayes
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Montaldo
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toler
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Montemayor
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delois Gamble
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Thompson
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Burney
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Locklear
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Smith
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Leadbeater
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Ecklund
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Hultberg
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kussman
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Carmona
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Canas
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hair
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Foard-Mandujano
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Bell
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Ake
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Hammonds
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Kussman
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen Allen
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Yost
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Melton
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Harris
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Rogers
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Britt
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Otey
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Pritchard
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Wheeler
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenric Melvin
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenita Compton
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Frye
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Hester
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Smith, Jr.
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Gregory
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Moon
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garna Parsley
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myong Frye
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Ellis
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Culver
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Dew
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Kirk
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Parsley
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Ragland
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Thaggard
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Smith, Jr.
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Jackson
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cox
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bledsoe
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ullom
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pany Butler
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Dieck
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wesselman
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Black
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Stewart
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura O'Brien
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Jackson
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Parker
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nellie Warren
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Maitland
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Mandujano
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Hardy
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Canady
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Thomas
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Rivers
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Ruble
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vonda Floyd
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Daniels
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Canady
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandisa Autry
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrol Heiner
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Barfield
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Wonderly
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Allen
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Dion
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Beard
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Raines
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Mitchell
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Prchal
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boris Calderon
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Healey
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Spencer
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Spencer
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickey Clevidence
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Holloway
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Lewis, Sr.
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Healey
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Stewart
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Canady
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Thomas
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Autry
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Beahm
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rodriguez
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Webb
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Herndon
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gertrude Kirk
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Moon
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Rosenberg
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Wayman
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Gregory
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Hardy
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Hofstrom
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Jackson
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Williams
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Phillips
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louanna Cordova
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Phillips
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Holloway
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernette Thaggard
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Wheeler, Sr.
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Manuel
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Brown
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dunn
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Evans
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tisher Raye
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Mitchell
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Philpot
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Hales
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Philpot
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Wonderly
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malenna Orndorf
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Yost
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keresea Cox
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levetta Melvin
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Rosenberg
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Clemenger
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Parker, Jr.
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Fogleman
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Rogers
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Spencer
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ragland
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Canady
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis Bledsoe
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jakob Ecklund
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Canady
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Compton
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Council
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Brown, Jr.
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velda Kester
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Callihan
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Hofstrom
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Benson
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Manuel
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hales
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Fulton
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stephens
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Brown
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Kelley
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Beahm
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Smith
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Dickens
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence White
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Chapman
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O'Brien
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nedra Jackson
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McLamb
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Otey
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Parker, Jr.
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Jones
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Toler, Jr.
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Jackson
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Dieck
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Brogdon-Wilcox
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Spencer
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Rodriguez
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elwood Heiner
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ruble
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Beard
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Pugh
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Pugh
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Pierce
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Engler
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Wayman
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Kelley
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Council
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Odom
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Wheeler, Jr.
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Calderon
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Hensley
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karabeth Hammonds
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Spencer
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Young
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Watson
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Raines
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Key
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Smith
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernell Ullom
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Dunn
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Price
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Jones
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Wheeler
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Hester
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Gilmore
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Prchal
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Jackson
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Thaggard
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Morris
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Chapman
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mitchell
Represented By: J. Harold Seagle
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Brett D Land
Represented By: Stephen C Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
Represented By: Kenneth J. Reilly
Represented By: Thomas Hamilton Segars
Represented By: David R. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHEMOURS COMPANY
Represented By: Kenneth J. Reilly
Represented By: Thomas Hamilton Segars
Represented By: David R. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth J. Reilly
Represented By: Thomas Hamilton Segars
Represented By: David R. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?