Relentless Inc et al v. U.S. Department of Commerce et al
Plaintiff: Seafreeze Fleet LLC, Huntress, Inc and Relentless Inc
Defendant: Neil Jacobs, Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver and U.S. Department of Commerce
Case Number: 1:2020cv00108
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Neil Jacobs, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, Chris Oliver, Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., U.S. Department of Commerce.(Finnegan, Alison)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response re #11 Response to Motion, filed by All Defendants. (Finnegan, Alison)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE In Opposition to #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Columbia filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 4/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Mulvey Declaration)(Holley, Kevin)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Columbia filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Proposed Form of Order, #3 Exhibit A (Loper Bright Enterprises v. Ross, Case No. 20-cv-0466 (D.D.C.)), #4 Exhibit B (Admin. Office of the Courts, U.S. District Court Judicial Caseload Profiles for D.R.I. and D.D.C.))(Finnegan, Alison)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Finnegan on behalf of All Defendants (Finnegan, Alison)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Seafreeze Fleet LLC, Huntress, Inc, Relentless Inc for Affidavit of service for Plaintiffs Neil Jacobs served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020; National Marine Fisheries Service served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020; National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020; Chris Oliver served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020; Wilbur L. Ross, Jr. served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020; U.S. Department of Commerce served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Holley, Kevin)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Vecchione filed by All Plaintiffs and granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kara Rollins filed by All Plaintiffs. - So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/10/2020. (McGuire, Vickie)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Huntress, Inc, Relentless Inc, Seafreeze Fleet LLC. (Holley, Kevin)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Request filed by Huntress, Inc, Relentless Inc, Seafreeze Fleet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Chris Oliver, #2 Neil Jacobs, #3 NMFS, #4 NOAA, #5 Wilbur Ross)(Holley, Kevin)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Kara Rollins to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1482000 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holley, Kevin)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for John Vecchione to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1481878 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Holley, Kevin)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 4, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1480902 ), filed by Seafreeze Fleet LLC, Huntress, Inc, Relentless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Holley, Kevin)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
March 4, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1480902 ), filed by Seafreeze Fleet LLC, Huntress, Inc, Relentless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Holley, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Relentless Inc et al v. U.S. Department of Commerce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seafreeze Fleet LLC
Represented By: Kevin J. Holley
Represented By: John Vecchione
Represented By: Kara M. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntress, Inc
Represented By: Kevin J. Holley
Represented By: John Vecchione
Represented By: Kara M. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Relentless Inc
Represented By: Kevin J. Holley
Represented By: John Vecchione
Represented By: Kara M. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Jacobs
Represented By: Alison Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur L. Ross, Jr.
Represented By: Alison Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Represented By: Alison Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Alison Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Oliver
Represented By: Alison Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Commerce
Represented By: Alison Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?